Kehoe v. Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership et al
Plaintiff: Donna Kehoe
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership and Walmart, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2024cv00043
Filed: January 12, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Robert M Spector
Referring Judge: Alvin W Thompson
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 29, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 29, 2024 Filing 18 NOTICE: The Initial Planning Conference set for March 1, 2024 is being continued to a date after Attorney Joseph T. Coppola II has filed an appearance. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 2/29/24. (Eagan, O.)
February 28, 2024 Filing 17 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Initial Planning Conference set for 3/1/2024 at 02:00 PM before Judge Alvin W. Thompson. Dial-in instructions have been emailed to counsel of record. Anyone wishing to observe this proceeding should contact chambers at 860-240-3224 to request the dial-in instructions. (Eagan, O.)
February 20, 2024 Filing 16 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Springer, George)
January 17, 2024 Filing 15 NOTICE by Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Walmart, Inc. Of Service of Court Orders in Removed Cases (Springer, George)
January 17, 2024 Filing 14 Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Walmart, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Walmart Inc., Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership for Walmart, Inc.; Other Affiliate WSE Investment, LLC, Other Affiliate WSE Management, LLC for Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership. (Springer, George)
January 17, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE by Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Walmart, Inc. Statement Regarding Removed Case Per Local Standing Orders (Springer, George)
January 17, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE by Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Walmart, Inc. of Pending Motions (Springer, George)
January 17, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE by Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Walmart, Inc. Certificate of Filing Copy of Notice of Removal in State Court (Springer, George)
January 16, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #6 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Walmart, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, #8 Notice of Appearance filed by Walmart, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, #3 Answer to Complaint filed by Walmart, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, #9 Notice of Appearance filed by Walmart, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, #5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Walmart, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, #7 Protective Order, 4 Notice re: Disclosure Statement, Signed by Clerk on 1/16/2024. (Attachments: #1 Standing order on removed cases)(Gaskins, A)
January 16, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Depascale, Jr on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Walmart, Inc. (Depascale, Michael)
January 16, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael D. Blumberg on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Walmart, Inc. (Blumberg, Michael)
January 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 1/12/2024.(Gaskins, A)
January 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 1/12/2024.(Gaskins, A)
January 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 3/12/2024 Discovery due by 7/13/2024 Dispositive Motions due by 8/17/2024 Signed by Clerk on 1/12/2024.(Gaskins, A)
January 12, 2024 Judge Alvin W. Thompson and Judge Robert M. Spector added. (Oliver, T.)
January 12, 2024 Filing 4 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 1/12/24.(Hushin, Z.)
January 12, 2024 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Walmart, Inc..(Springer, George)
January 12, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by George C. Springer, Jr on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Walmart, Inc. (Springer, George)
January 12, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Walmart, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership from New London, case number KNL-CV24-6065068-S. Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ACTDC-7612571, filed by Walmart, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership.(Springer, George)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kehoe v. Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Kehoe
Represented By: Joseph T. Coppola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership
Represented By: George C. Springer, Jr.
Represented By: Michael Depascale, Jr
Represented By: Michael D. Blumberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart, Inc.
Represented By: George C. Springer, Jr.
Represented By: Michael D. Blumberg
Represented By: Michael Depascale, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?