Panicali v. 3M Purification Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Panicali
Defendant: 3M Purification Inc., 3M Separation & Purification Sciences Division, Cuno Inc and Mark Lamelin
Case Number: 3:2024cv00095
Filed: January 25, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Kari A Dooley
Referring Judge: Maria E Garcia
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2024 Filing 19 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephonic Status Conference set for January 6, 2025 at 10:00 AM before Judge Kari A. Dooley. Telephonic Conference Line: 888-278-0296; Access Code: 80-77-899. (Alquesta, S)
March 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order on Pretrial Deadlines. The Court has reviewed the parties' #14 Rule 26(f) Report and held a Rule 16(b) Conference on March 13, 2024. The Rule 26(f) Report is Approved, Adopted, and So Ordered, except as may have been discussed during the conference. Pursuant to Local Rule 16(b), the Court orders as follows: The parties shall move to join additional parties by May 31, 2024. All discovery shall be concluded by July 31, 2025. Dispositive motions, if any (see Local Rule 56(c)), shall be filed by May 15, 2025. The Court will set a date for filing a joint trial memorandum after the close of discovery. The joint trial memorandum shall comport with this Court's standing order, which will be separately docketed.A telephonic status conference is scheduled for January 6, 2025, at 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 3/13/2024.(Alquesta, S)
March 13, 2024 Filing 17 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Kari A. Dooley: Telephonic Status Conference held on 3/13/2024. 19 minutes(Court Reporter Julie Monette.) (Gould, K.)
March 13, 2024 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Discovery due by 7/31/2025; Dispositive Motions due by 5/15/2025; Telephonic Status Conference set for 1/6/2025 10:00 AM before Judge Kari A. Dooley. (Alquesta, S)
March 8, 2024 Filing 16 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephonic Status Conference set for March 13, 2024 at 2:00 PM before Judge Kari A. Dooley. Telephonic Conference Line: 888-278-0296; Access Code: 80-77-899. (Alquesta, S)
March 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER. The Court has reviewed the parties' #14 Rule 26(f) Report. A telephonic status conference is scheduled for March 13, 2024 at 2:00 PM before Judge Kari A. Dooley. A calendar entry will be separately docketed. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 3/8/2024. (Alquesta, S)
March 7, 2024 Filing 14 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Flanagan, Robert)
February 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before April 3, 2024. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 2/29/2024. (Alquesta, S)
February 29, 2024 Answer deadline updated for 3M Purification Inc. f/k/a/ Cuno Inc. to 4/3/2024; 3M Separation & Purification Sciences Division to 4/3/2024; Mark Lamelin to 4/3/2024. (Alquesta, S)
February 28, 2024 Filing 12 Second MOTION for Extension of Time until April 3, 2024to Answer Complaint by 3M Purification Inc., 3M Separation & Purification Sciences Division, Cuno Inc, Mark Lamelin. (Gallagher, Robyn)
January 29, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert J. Flanagan, Jr on behalf of Joseph Panicali (Flanagan, Robert)
January 26, 2024 Answer deadline updated for 3M Purification Inc. to 3/4/2024; 3M Separation & Purification Sciences Division to 3/4/2024; Cuno Inc to 3/4/2024; Mark Lamelin to 3/4/2024. (Gould, K.)
January 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall respond to to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before March 4, 2024. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 1/26/2024. (Alquesta, Steven)
January 26, 2024 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time until March 4, 2024to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by 3M Purification Inc., 3M Separation & Purification Sciences Division, Cuno Inc, Mark Lamelin. (Gallagher, Robyn)
January 26, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of 2 Notice re: Disclosure Statement, #4 Disclosure Statement, filed by 3M Separation & Purification Sciences Division, 3M Purification Inc., Mark Lamelin, Cuno Inc, #7 Protective Order, #6 Electronic Filing Order, #5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by 3M Separation & Purification Sciences Division, 3M Purification Inc., Mark Lamelin, Cuno Inc, #3 Notice of Appearance filed by 3M Separation & Purification Sciences Division, 3M Purification Inc., Mark Lamelin, Cuno Inc. Signed by Clerk on 1/26/2024. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removed Cases)(Fanelle, N.)
January 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 1/25/2024. (Fanelle, N.)
January 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 1/25/2024. (Fanelle, N.)
January 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 3/25/2024 Discovery due by 7/26/2024 Dispositive Motions due by 8/30/2024. Signed by Clerk on 1/25/2024. (Fanelle, N.)
January 25, 2024 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement by 3M Purification Inc., 3M Separation & Purification Sciences Division, Cuno Inc, Mark Lamelin identifying Corporate Parent 3M Purification, Inc. for 3M Purification Inc.; Other Affiliate 3M Separation & Purification Sciences Division for Cuno Inc. (Gallagher, Robyn)
January 25, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Robyn E. Gallagher on behalf of 3M Purification Inc., 3M Separation & Purification Sciences Division, Cuno Inc, Mark Lamelin (Gallagher, Robyn)
January 25, 2024 Filing 2 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 1/25/2024.(Maturo, F.)
January 25, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by MARK LAMELIN, 3M PURIFICATION INC., CUNO, INC., 3M SEPARATION & PURIFICATION SCIENCES DIVISION from Danbury Superior Court, case number DBD-CV-24-6048769-S. Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ACTDC-7626053, filed by MARK LAMELIN, 3M PURIFICATION INC., CUNO, INC., 3M SEPARATION & PURIFICATION SCIENCES DIVISION. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Boyle, #2 Exhibit Ex 1 to Boyle Declaration, #3 Affidavit Gallagher, #4 Exhibit Ex 1 to Gallagher Declaration, #5 Exhibit Ex 2 to Gallagher Declaration, #6 Exhibit Ex 3 to Gallagher Declaration, #7 Exhibit Civil Coversheet)(Gallagher, Robyn)
January 25, 2024 Judge Kari A. Dooley and Judge Maria E. Garcia added. (Freberg, B)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Panicali v. 3M Purification Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Panicali
Represented By: Garrett M. Moore
Represented By: Robert J. Flanagan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Purification Inc.
Represented By: Robyn E. Gallagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Separation & Purification Sciences Division
Represented By: Robyn E. Gallagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cuno Inc
Represented By: Robyn E. Gallagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Lamelin
Represented By: Robyn E. Gallagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?