Hollis v. Ahold USA, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Ann Hollis
Defendant: Ahold USA, Inc, Ahold Delhaize USA, Inc, Retail Business Services LLC and Stop & Shop Supermarket Company, LLC
Case Number: 3:2024cv00138
Filed: February 2, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Maria E Garcia
Referring Judge: Sarala V Nagala
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101 Americans with Disabilities Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 15, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2024 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Stop & Shop Supermarket Company, LLC waiver sent on 2/8/2024, answer due 4/8/2024 filed by Ann Hollis. (West, Catherine)
February 15, 2024 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Retail Business Services LLC waiver sent on 2/8/2024, answer due 4/8/2024 filed by Ann Hollis. (West, Catherine)
February 15, 2024 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Ahold USA, Inc waiver sent on 2/8/2024, answer due 4/8/2024 filed by Ann Hollis. (West, Catherine)
February 15, 2024 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Ahold Delhaize USA, Inc waiver sent on 2/8/2024, answer due 4/8/2024 filed by Ann Hollis. (West, Catherine)
February 14, 2024 Filing 11 Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 2/14/2024.(Bozek, Michael)
February 5, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Varraso on behalf of Ann Hollis (Varraso, Michael)
February 5, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Jacob Wyatt on behalf of Ann Hollis (Wyatt, Benjamin)
February 5, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES: Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #7 Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction, #1 Complaint, filed by Ann Hollis, #4 Electronic Filing Order, #5 Standing Protective Order, 2 Notice re: Disclosure Statement, #6 Notice. Signed by Clerk on 2/5/2024. (Mendez, D)
February 2, 2024 Filing 7 Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. (Mendez, D)
February 2, 2024 Filing 6 Notice re Initial Discovery Protocols. Signed by Clerk on 2/2/2024. (Attachments: #1 Initial Discovery Attachment) (Mendez, D)
February 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Standing Protective Order. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 2/2/2024. (Mendez, D)
February 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 2/2/2024. (Mendez, D)
February 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 4/2/2024. Discovery due by 8/3/2024. Dispositive Motions due by 9/7/2024. Signed by Clerk on 2/2/2024. (Mendez, D)
February 2, 2024 Filing 2 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 2/2/24.(Hushin, Z.)
February 2, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Hollis against Ahold Delhaize USA, Inc, Ahold USA, Inc, Retail Business Services LLC, Stop & Shop Supermarket Company LC ( Filing fee $405 receipt number ACTDC-7636066.), filed by Ann Hollis. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Civil Cover Sheet)(West, Catherine) Modified on 2/2/2024 to correct party (Hushin, Z.).
February 2, 2024 Judge Sarala V. Nagala and Judge Maria E. Garcia added. (Oliver, T.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hollis v. Ahold USA, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann Hollis
Represented By: Catherine West
Represented By: Benjamin Jacob Wyatt
Represented By: Michael Varraso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ahold USA, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ahold Delhaize USA, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Retail Business Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stop & Shop Supermarket Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?