Ward v. Planet Home Lending, LLC
Plaintiff: Joe Ward
Defendant: Planet Home Lending, LLC
Case Number: 3:2024cv00158
Filed: February 6, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Kari A Dooley
Referring Judge: S Dave Vatti
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER re Consolidation. See attached Order. Case numbers 3:24-cv-130, 3:24-cv-131, 3:24-cv-140, 3:24-cv-145, and 3:24-cv-158 are consolidated into 3:24-cv-127. The Clerk of the Court is directed to consolidate the cases. Future filings should be docketed in 3:24-cv-127 only. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 3/1/2024. (Haider, S)
February 29, 2024 Filing 25 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Kari A. Dooley: Telephonic Status Conference held on 2/29/2024. 4 minutes (time split)(Court Reporter Tracy Gow.) (Gould, K.)
February 23, 2024 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald K Williams, Jr on behalf of Planet Home Lending, LLC (Williams, Ronald)
February 23, 2024 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Aravind Swaminathan on behalf of Planet Home Lending, LLC (Swaminathan, Aravind)
February 23, 2024 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc Shapiro on behalf of Planet Home Lending, LLC (Shapiro, Marc)
February 22, 2024 Filing 20 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephonic Status Conference set for 2/29/2024 at 10:00 a.m. before Judge Kari A. Dooley. Telephonic Conference Line: 888-278-0296; Access Code: 80-77-899. (Haider, S)
February 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties shall appear for a Telephonic Status Conference on February 29, 2024 at 10:00 a.m. A separate calendar shall enter. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 2/22/2024. (Haider, S)
February 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Aravind Swaminathan ; granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Ronald Kenneth Williams Jr; granting #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Marc R. Shapiro. Signed by Clerk on 2/15/2024. (Fanelle, N.)
February 15, 2024 Filing 17 Disclosure Statement by Planet Home Lending, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Green Planet Mortgage, LLC for Planet Home Lending, LLC. (Atta-Krah, Kenton)
February 14, 2024 Filing 16 MOTION for Attorney(s) Marc R. Shapiro to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7649246) by Planet Home Lending, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Atta-Krah, Kenton) Modified on 2/15/2024 to adjust referral settings (Jacques, Djess).
February 14, 2024 Filing 15 MOTION for Attorney(s) Ronald Kenneth Williams Jr. to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7649243) by Planet Home Lending, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Atta-Krah, Kenton) Modified on 2/15/2024 to adjust referral settings (Jacques, Djess).
February 14, 2024 Filing 14 MOTION for Attorney(s) Aravind Swaminathan to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7649237) by Planet Home Lending, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing (Atta-Krah, Kenton) Modified on 2/15/2024 to adjust referral settings (Jacques, Djess).
February 14, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenton K. Atta-Krah on behalf of Planet Home Lending, LLC (Atta-Krah, Kenton)
February 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Kari A. Dooley for all further proceedings. Signed by Senior District Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 2/12/2024. (Reis, Julia)
February 9, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE of Related Case by Joe Ward (Dumain, Sanford)
February 7, 2024 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Planet Home Lending, LLC waiver sent on 2/7/2024, answer due 4/7/2024 filed by Joe Ward. (Dumain, Sanford)
February 7, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #6 Protective Order, #7 Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction, #1 Complaint filed by Joe Ward, #2 Disclosure Statement filed by Joe Ward, #4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, 3 Notice re: Disclosure Statement, #5 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 2/7/2024. (Oliver, T.)
February 7, 2024 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Planet Home Lending, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Sanford P. Dumain* *Milberg LLP* *One Pennsylvania Plaza* *New York, NY 10119-0165*. (Oliver, T.)
February 6, 2024 Filing 7 Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. (Oliver, T.)
February 6, 2024 Filing 6 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Senior District Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 2/6/2024. (Oliver, T.)
February 6, 2024 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Senior District Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 2/6/2024. (Oliver, T.)
February 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 4/6/2024 Discovery due by 8/7/2024 Dispositive Motions due by 9/11/2024 Signed by Clerk on 2/6/2024. (Oliver, T.)
February 6, 2024 Senior District Judge Stefan R. Underhill and Judge S. Dave Vatti added. (Oliver, T.)
February 6, 2024 Filing 3 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 2/6/24.(Hushin, Z.)
February 6, 2024 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement by Joe Ward. (Dumain, Sanford)
February 6, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Planet Home Lending, LLC ( Filing fee $405 receipt number ACTDC-7639671.), filed by Joe Ward. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dumain, Sanford)
February 6, 2024 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Planet Home Lending, LLC. (Dumain, Sanford)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ward v. Planet Home Lending, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Ward
Represented By: Sanford P. Dumain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Planet Home Lending, LLC
Represented By: Aravind Swaminathan
Represented By: Kenton K. Atta-Krah
Represented By: Marc Shapiro
Represented By: Ronald K Williams, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?