Sanchez-Rivera v. Rich Products Corporation
Plaintiff: Genesis Sanchez-Rivera
Defendant: Rich Products Corporation
Case Number: 3:2024cv00160
Filed: February 7, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Kari A Dooley
Referring Judge: S Dave Vatti
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STANDING ORDER ON JOINT TRIAL MEMORANDA. See attached. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 3/25/2024. (Chambers, J.)
March 25, 2024 Filing 22 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephonic Status Conference set for April 15, 2025 at 10:00 AM before Judge Kari A. Dooley. Telephonic Conference Line: 888-278-0296; Access Code: 80-77-899. (Chambers, J.)
March 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Order on Pretrial Deadlines. The Court has reviewed the parties' #20 Rule 26(f) Report. It is Approved, Adopted, and So Ordered, except that the parties' joint trial memorandum shall be filed in accordance with the procedure set forth below. Pursuant to Local Rule 16(b), the Court orders as follows: The Plaintiff shall move to amend the pleadings or move to join additional parties by April 15, 2024. The Defendant shall move to join additional parties and respond to the complaint by May 15, 2024. All discovery shall be concluded by March 31, 2025. Dispositive motions, if any (see Local Rule 56(c)), shall be filed by May 30, 2025. The Court will set a date for filing a joint trial memorandum after the close of discovery. The joint trial memorandum shall comport with this Court's standing order, which will be separately docketed. A telephonic status conference is scheduled for April 15, 2025 at 10:00AM. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 3/25/2024. (Chambers, J.)
March 25, 2024 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Motion to Amend Pleadings due by 4/15/2024; Discovery due by 3/31/2025; Dispositive Motions due by 5/30/2025; Telephonic Status Conference set for 4/15/2025 at 10:00 AM before Judge Kari A. Dooley. (Chambers, J.)
March 22, 2024 Filing 20 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Simeonidis, Sara)
March 15, 2024 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) and Affirmative Defenses by Rich Products Corporation.(Simeonidis, Sara)
February 14, 2024 Filing 18 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Genesis Sanchez-Rivera. (Reilly, Michael)
February 14, 2024 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael John Reilly on behalf of Genesis Sanchez-Rivera (Reilly, Michael)
February 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall respond to Plaintiff's complaint on or before March 15, 2024. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 2/13/2024. (Alquesta, Steven)
February 9, 2024 Filing 15 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until March 15, 2024 In Which To Respond To Complaint #1 Notice of Removal, by Rich Products Corporation. (Simeonidis, Sara)
February 8, 2024 Filing 14 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #10 Electronic Filing Order, #6 Notice (Other) filed by Rich Products Corporation, #7 Disclosure Statement filed by Rich Products Corporation, #13 Notice, #5 Notice (Other) filed by Rich Products Corporation, #9 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Notice (Other) filed by Rich Products Corporation, #11 Standing Protective Order, #3 Notice of Appearance filed by Rich Products Corporation, #12 Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Rich Products Corporation, 8 Notice re: Disclosure Statement, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Rich Products Corporation. Signed by Clerk on 2/8/2024. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removed Cases) (Fanelle, N.)
February 7, 2024 Filing 13 Notice re: Initial Discovery Protocols. Signed by Clerk on 2/7/2024. (Attachments: #1 Discovery Attachment) (Fanelle, N.)
February 7, 2024 Filing 12 Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. (Fanelle, N.)
February 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Standing Protective Order Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 2/7/2024. (Fanelle, N.)
February 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 2/7/2024. (Fanelle, N.)
February 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 4/7/2024 Discovery due by 8/8/2024 Dispositive Motions due by 9/12/2024 Signed by Clerk on 2/7/2024. (Fanelle, N.)
February 7, 2024 Filing 8 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 2/7/2024.(Perez, J.)
February 7, 2024 Filing 7 Disclosure Statement by Rich Products Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Rich Holdings Group Inc. for Rich Products Corporation. (Simeonidis, Sara)
February 7, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE by Rich Products Corporation re #1 Notice of Removal, Statement Regarding Removal (Simeonidis, Sara)
February 7, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE by Rich Products Corporation re #1 Notice of Removal, Notice of Pending Motions (Simeonidis, Sara)
February 7, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE by Rich Products Corporation re #1 Notice of Removal, Certificate of Filing and Service of Petition for Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Simeonidis, Sara)
February 7, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph William Fazzino on behalf of Rich Products Corporation (Fazzino, Joseph)
February 7, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Sara R. Simeonidis on behalf of Rich Products Corporation (Simeonidis, Sara)
February 7, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Rich Products Corporation from Superior Court Judicial District of New Britain, case number HHB-CV24-6083850-S. Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ACTDC-7640628, filed by Rich Products Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Simeonidis, Sara)
February 7, 2024 Judge Kari A. Dooley and Judge S. Dave Vatti added. (Oliver, T.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanchez-Rivera v. Rich Products Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Genesis Sanchez-Rivera
Represented By: Emanuele Robert Cicchiello
Represented By: Michael John Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rich Products Corporation
Represented By: Joseph William Fazzino
Represented By: Sara R. Simeonidis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?