Trustees of the I.U.O.E. Local 478 Annuity Fund et al v. Grasso Companies, LLC
Counter Defendant: Trustees of the I.U.O.E. Local 478 Annuity Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Local 478 Training and Skill Improvement Fund, Trustees of the I.U.O.E. Local No. 478 Health Benefits Fund, Trustees of the I.U.O.E. Local 478 Pension Fund, Trustees of the I.U.O.E. Local 478 Supplemental Unemployment Benefits Fund and I.U.O.E. Local Union No. 478
Counter Claimant: Grasso Companies, LLC
Case Number: 3:2024cv00223
Filed: February 20, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Maria E Garcia
Referring Judge: Alvin W Thompson
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2024 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against I.U.O.E. Local Union No. 478, Trustees of the I.U.O.E. Local 478 Annuity Fund, Trustees of the I.U.O.E. Local 478 Pension Fund, Trustees of the I.U.O.E. Local 478 Supplemental Unemployment Benefits Fund, Trustees of the I.U.O.E. Local No. 478 Health Benefits Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Local 478 Training and Skill Improvement Fund by Grasso Companies, LLC.(Mirman, Jeffrey)
March 19, 2024 Answer deadline updated for Grasso Companies, LLC to 4/2/2024. (Ferguson, L.)
March 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: The defendant's Motion for Extension of Time (ECF No. #12 ) is hereby GRANTED in part. The defendant is granted an extension to April 2, 2024 only. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 3/19/24. (Eagan, O.)
March 18, 2024 Filing 13 Disclosure Statement by Grasso Companies, LLC. (Mirman, Jeffrey)
March 18, 2024 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time until April 8, 2024 to Respond to Complaint by Grasso Companies, LLC. (Mirman, Jeffrey)
March 18, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey J. Mirman on behalf of Grasso Companies, LLC (Mirman, Jeffrey)
March 8, 2024 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by I.U.O.E. Local Union No. 478, Trustees of the I.U.O.E. Local 478 Pension Fund, Trustees of the I.U.O.E. Local 478 Annuity Fund, Trustees of the I.U.O.E. Local No. 478 Health Benefits Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Local 478 Training and Skill Improvement Fund, Trustees of the I.U.O.E. Local 478 Supplemental Unemployment Benefits Fund. Grasso Companies, LLC served on 2/28/2024, answer due 3/20/2024. (Lovejoy, Alexander)
February 26, 2024 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Grasso Companies, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Alexander Steven Lovejoy* *Robert M. Cheverie & Associates, P.C.* *333 East River Drive Suite 101* *East Hartford, CT 06108*. (Mendez, D)
February 23, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE by I.U.O.E. Local Union No. 478, Trustees of the I.U.O.E. Local 478 Annuity Fund, Trustees of the I.U.O.E. Local 478 Pension Fund, Trustees of the I.U.O.E. Local 478 Supplemental Unemployment Benefits Fund, Trustees of the I.U.O.E. Local No. 478 Health Benefits Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Local 478 Training and Skill Improvement Fund (Lovejoy, Alexander)
February 23, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #5 Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction, 2 Notice re: Disclosure Statement, #6 Standing Protective Order, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint, filed by Trustees of the I.U.O.E. Local 478 Pension Fund, Trustees of the I.U.O.E. Local No. 478 Health Benefits Fund, Trustees of the I.U.O.E. Local 478 Annuity Fund, Trustees of the I.U.O.E. Local 478 Supplemental Unemployment Benefits Fund, I.U.O.E. Local Union No. 478, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Local 478 Training and Skill Improvement Fund Signed by Clerk on 2/23/2024.(Gaskins, A)
February 23, 2024 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Grasso Companies, LLC. (Lovejoy, Alexander)
February 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Standing Protective Order Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 2/20/2024.(Gaskins, A)
February 20, 2024 Filing 5 Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. (Gaskins, A)
February 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 2/20/2024.(Gaskins, A)
February 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 4/20/2024 Discovery due by 8/21/2024 Dispositive Motions due by 9/25/2024 Signed by Clerk on 2/20/2024.(Gaskins, A)
February 20, 2024 Judge Alvin W. Thompson and Judge Maria E. Garcia added. (Oliver, T.)
February 20, 2024 Filing 2 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 2/20/2024.(Maturo, F.)
February 20, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Grasso Companies, LLC ( Filing fee $405 receipt number ACTDC-7653982.), filed by I.U.O.E. Local Union No. 478, Trustees of the I.U.O.E. Local 478 Pension Fund, Trustees of the I.U.O.E. Local 478 Annuity Fund, Trustees of the I.U.O.E. Local No. 478 Health Benefits Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Local 478 Training and Skill Improvement Fund, Trustees of the I.U.O.E. Local 478 Supplemental Unemployment Benefits Fund.(Lovejoy, Alexander)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trustees of the I.U.O.E. Local 478 Annuity Fund et al v. Grasso Companies, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Trustees of the I.U.O.E. Local 478 Annuity Fund
Represented By: Alexander Steven Lovejoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Trustees of the Operating Engineers Local 478 Training and Skill Improvement Fund
Represented By: Alexander Steven Lovejoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Trustees of the I.U.O.E. Local No. 478 Health Benefits Fund
Represented By: Alexander Steven Lovejoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Trustees of the I.U.O.E. Local 478 Pension Fund
Represented By: Alexander Steven Lovejoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Trustees of the I.U.O.E. Local 478 Supplemental Unemployment Benefits Fund
Represented By: Alexander Steven Lovejoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: I.U.O.E. Local Union No. 478
Represented By: Alexander Steven Lovejoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Grasso Companies, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Mirman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?