State of Connecticut v. 3M Company et al
Plaintiff: State of Connecticut
Defendant: 3M Company, AGC Chemicals Americas, Inc., Amerex Corporation, Angus Fire Armour Corporation, Archroma U.S., Inc., Arkema Inc., BASF Corporation, Buckeye Fire Equipment Company, Carrier Fire & Security Americas Corporation, Carrier Global Corporation, ChemDesign Products, Inc., Chemguard, Inc., Chemicals Incorporated, Clariant Corporation, Corteva, Inc., Daikin America, Inc., Deepwater Chemicals, Inc., Dupont De Nemours, Inc., Dynax Corporation, EIDP, Inc., Fire Service Plus, Inc., Kidde-Fenwal, Inc., National Ford Chemical Company, National Foam, Inc., RTX Corporation, The Chemours Company, The Chemours Company FC, LLC, Tyco Fire Products LP, John Doe Defendants 1 through 100, Nation Ford Chemical Company, Chemours Company, Chemours Company FC, LLC and John Doe
Case Number: 3:2024cv00234
Filed: February 21, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet C Hall
Referring Judge: Robert M Spector
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2024 Acknowledgment of Receipt re: Case Transferred Out - Case transferred from Connecticut has been opened in District of South Carolina as case 2:24-cv-01217, filed 03/12/2024. (Oliver, T.)
March 12, 2024 Filing 20 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER. Case transferred to the District of South Carolina. Signed by Tiffaney D. Peter, Clerk of the MDL Panel. (Freberg, B)
March 12, 2024 Case electronically transferred to the District of South Carolina. (Freberg, B)
February 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #17 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until 30 days after a final decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation for all Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 2/28/2024. (Barry, L.)
February 28, 2024 Filing 18 NOTICE by 3M Company - Statement Pursuant to Standing Order on Removed Cases (Smith, Kevin)
February 28, 2024 Answer deadline updated for 3M Company to 3/29/2024. (Barry, L.)
February 26, 2024 Filing 17 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until 30 days after a final decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation for all Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by 3M Company. (Smith, Kevin)
February 22, 2024 Filing 16 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #15 Order, #12 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, 5 Notice re: Disclosure Statement, #14 Protective Order, #3 Disclosure Statement filed by 3M Company, #2 Notice (Other) filed by 3M Company, Tyco Fire Products LP, Chemguard, Inc., #1 Notice of Removal, filed by 3M Company, Tyco Fire Products LP, Chemguard, Inc., #13 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Notice of Appearance filed by 3M Company Signed by Clerk on 2/22/2024. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removed Cases)(Freberg, B)
February 22, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael W Lynch on behalf of State of Connecticut (Lynch, Michael)
February 22, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Kaelah M. Smith on behalf of State of Connecticut (Smith, Kaelah)
February 22, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew I. Levine on behalf of State of Connecticut (Levine, Matthew)
February 22, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Patrick Kelly on behalf of State of Connecticut (Kelly, Christopher)
February 22, 2024 Filing 7 Disclosure Statement by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP identifying Corporate Parent Johnson Controls International plc for Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP. (Lauricella, Michael)
February 22, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Joseph Lauricella on behalf of Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP (Lauricella, Michael)
February 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STANDING ORDER re Discovery. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 2/21/2024.(Freberg, B)
February 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 2/21/2024.(Freberg, B)
February 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 2/21/2024.(Freberg, B)
February 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 4/21/2024 Discovery due by 8/22/2024 Dispositive Motions due by 9/26/2024 Signed by Clerk on 2/21/2024.(Freberg, B)
February 21, 2024 Filing 5 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 2/21/24.(Hushin, Z.)
February 21, 2024 Judge Janet C. Hall and Judge Robert M. Spector added. (Oliver, T.)
February 21, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin M. Smith on behalf of 3M Company (Smith, Kevin)
February 21, 2024 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement by 3M Company. (Glasser, James)
February 21, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE by 3M Company, Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP of Pending Motions (Glasser, James)
February 21, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by 3M Company, Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP from State of Connecticut Superior Court of the Judicial District of Hartford, case number HHD-CV24-6179562-S. Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ACTDC-7655962, filed by 3M Company, Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Filings)(Glasser, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of Connecticut v. 3M Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Connecticut
Represented By: Christopher Patrick Kelly
Represented By: Matthew I. Levine
Represented By: William Morten Tong
Represented By: Kaelah M. Smith
Represented By: Michael W Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Represented By: Kevin M. Smith
Represented By: James I. Glasser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AGC Chemicals Americas, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerex Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angus Fire Armour Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Archroma U.S., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkema Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BASF Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrier Fire & Security Americas Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrier Global Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ChemDesign Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemguard, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Joseph Lauricella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemicals Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clariant Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corteva, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daikin America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deepwater Chemicals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dupont De Nemours, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dynax Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EIDP, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fire Service Plus, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kidde-Fenwal, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Ford Chemical Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Foam, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RTX Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Chemours Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Chemours Company FC, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyco Fire Products LP
Represented By: Michael Joseph Lauricella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Defendants 1 through 100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nation Ford Chemical Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemours Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemours Company FC, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?