Lemiska v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Emily Lemiska
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2024cv00247
Filed: February 23, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Michael P Shea
Referring Judge: S Dave Vatti
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 0405 dc Review of SSA Decision SSDC - Concurrent Title II and Title XVI Claims
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 18, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2024 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Dispositive Motions due by 6/14/2024. (Jacques, D)
April 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER. The Government having filed the administrative record, the Court hereby enters the following Scheduling Order: Plaintiff shall file a motion to reverse and/or remand and supporting memorandum of law no later than May 15, 2024. Defendant shall then have until June 14, 2024, to file a motion to affirm or a motion for voluntary remand. Within 14 days after Defendant files its motion, Plaintiff may file a reply pursuant to Local Rule 7(d). Prior to the filing of any dispositive motions, the parties are encouraged to confer regarding the merits of the case in an effort to determine whether a reversal and voluntary remand are appropriate.The Court reminds the parties of the previously filed Standing Order which sets forth page limits and form and content requirements for motions and supporting memoranda. In addition to complying with these requirements, memoranda should avoid boilerplate discussions of the governing legal standards as the Court is familiar with the standard of review and the sequential evaluation process employed in the analysis of Social Security disability applications. The parties should focus on informing the Court of relevant and controlling legal authority and applying it to the facts of this case. Motions filed by the parties must comply with the requirements set forth above, in the Standing Order, and in the Local Rules of Civil Procedure. Failure to comply may result in denial of the motion. Any motion for extension of a deadline must comply with the Social Security Standing Order and Local Rule 7(b)(2) and must be filed at least three (3) days before the existing deadline. SO ORDERED at Bridgeport, Connecticut. Signed by Judge S. Dave Vatti on 4/12/2024. (Ellis, B)
April 11, 2024 Filing 18 Absent consent to a Magistrate Judge, this case is referred to Magistrate Judge S. Dave Vatti for all purposes including issuing a Recommended Ruling. Signed by Judge Michael P Shea on 4/11/2024.(Maturo, F.)
April 8, 2024 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Commissioner of Social Security of Certified Administrative Record (Lechleitner, Andreea)
April 8, 2024 Filing 16 NOTICE by Commissioner of Social Security of filing of unofficial text-searchable copy of certified administrative record (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Unofficial Text-Searchable Copy of Certified Administrative Record)(Lechleitner, Andreea)
April 8, 2024 Filing 15 Social Security Transcripts. (Lechleitner, Andreea)
April 3, 2024 Filing fee received from EMILY LEMISKA: $ 405.00, receipt number HFD 21141. (Mendez, D)
April 2, 2024 Set Deadlines: Dismissal due by 4/23/2024. (Johnson, D.)
April 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: On February 23, 2024, the plaintiff was ordered to either pay the filing fee or file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis by March 24, 2024, and if she did not, the case was subject to dismissal. The Court now notifies the plaintiff that it will dismiss this case without further notice if no filing fee or motion to proceed in forma pauperis is received by April 23, 2024. Signed by Michael P. Shea, Chief Judge, on April 2, 2024.(Housman, L)
March 22, 2024 Filing 13 MOTION by Self-Represented Litigant to Participate in Electronic Filing by Emily Lemiska. (Peterson, M)
March 22, 2024 Filing 12 Consent to Electronic Notice by Emily Lemiska (Peterson, M)
February 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 REMINDER: Standing ORDER on Social Security Appeals Signed by Judge Michael P Shea on 2/27/2024. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Maturo, F.)
February 26, 2024 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Commissioner of Social Security (Lechleitner, Andreea)
February 26, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Andreea Lechleitner on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Lechleitner, Andreea)
February 26, 2024 Filing 8 Notice of New SSA Action: Electronic service of the complaint was made by the Clerk's Office upon the Social Security Office of General Counsel and the US Attorney's Office for the District of Connecticut. (Chartier, A.)
February 23, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE to Self-represented Parties. Signed by Clerk on 2/23/2024.(Chartier, A.)
February 23, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE to Counsel: Due to privacy restrictions on social security cases, absent both a consent to electronic notice and an approved motion for efiling privileges, counsel must mail paper copies to self-represented litigants. Signed by Clerk on 2/23/2024.(Chartier, A.)
February 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P Shea on 2/23/2024.(Chartier, A.)
February 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Standing ORDER Re: Social Security Cases. Signed by Judge Michael P Shea on 2/23/2024.(Chartier, A.)
February 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Standing ORDER on Social Security Appeals. Signed by Judge Michael P Shea on 2/23/2024. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Chartier, A.)
February 23, 2024 Judge Michael P Shea and Judge Maria E. Garcia added. (Freberg, B)
February 23, 2024 Answer deadline updated for Commissioner of Social Security to 4/23/2024. (Chartier, A.)
February 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: We received your Complaint which has been assigned case number 24cv247. In order to proceed, the filing fee or a Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis must be submitted to the Court by 3/24/2024 or the case will be subject to dismissal. Fee information and the Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis form may be found on the Court's website at ctd.uscourts.gov. Dismissal due by 3/24/2024. Signed by Clerk on 2/23/2024.(Chartier, A.)
February 23, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Emily Lemiska.(Chartier, A.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lemiska v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily Lemiska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Andreea Lechleitner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?