Caldrello v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Sandra V. Caldrello
Defendant: Brock Scott, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Fannie Mae, Bendett & McHugh, Seyfarth Shaw LLP, K L Gates PLLP and MERS
Case Number: 3:2024cv00268
Filed: February 27, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Maria E Garcia
Referring Judge: Michael P Shea
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31 U.S.C. ยง 3729 False Claims Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2024 Filing 34 OBJECTION re #31 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Sandra V. Caldrello. (Peterson, M)
April 15, 2024 Set Deadlines as to #31 MOTION to Dismiss , #25 MOTION to Dismiss , #29 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction .(Responses due by 5/2/2024, ), or ( Amended Complaint due by 5/2/2024) (Johnson, D.)
April 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER: Defendants Seyfarth Shaw LLP, Fannie Mae, K L Gates PLLP, MERS, and Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. have filed Motions to Dismiss. ECF Nos. 25, 29, and 31. On or before May 2, 2024, Plaintiff shall either file a response to each of the motions or file an amended complaint in which she pleads as many facts as possible, consistent with Rule 11, to address the alleged defects discussed in Defendants' memoranda of law. The Court will not allow further amendments after May 2, 2024. If Plaintiff chooses to amend and if Defendants renew their motions to dismiss, Defendants may incorporate by reference any prior briefing. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 4/15/24. (Constantine, A.)
April 11, 2024 Filing 32 NOTICE by K L Gates PLLP, MERS, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. to Self-Represented Litigants Regarding Motions to Dismiss as required by Local Rule 12 (Higgins, Sean)
April 11, 2024 Filing 31 MOTION to Dismiss by K L Gates PLLP, MERS, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A..Responses due by 5/2/2024 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Higgins, Sean)
April 5, 2024 Filing 30 AFFIDAVIT re #29 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Signed By Joshua L. Milrad filed by Fannie Mae. (Milrad, Joshua)
April 5, 2024 Filing 29 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Fannie Mae.Responses due by 4/26/2024 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Joshua L. Milrad)(Milrad, Joshua)
April 4, 2024 Set Deadlines as to #25 MOTION to Dismiss .(Responses due by 4/24/2024, ), or ( Amended Complaint due by 4/24/2024) (Johnson, D.)
April 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER: Defendant Seyfarth Shaw LLP has filed a Motion to Dismiss. (ECF No. #25 ). On or before April 24, 2024, Plaintiff shall either file a response to the motion or file an amended complaint in which she pleads as many facts as possible, consistent with Rule 11, to address the alleged defects discussed in Defendant's memorandum of law. The Court will not allow further amendments after April 24, 2024. If Plaintiff chooses to amend and if Defendant renews its motion to dismiss, Defendant may incorporate by reference any prior briefing. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 4/4/24. (Constantine, A.)
April 3, 2024 Filing 27 NOTICE by Seyfarth Shaw LLP re #25 MOTION to Dismiss Notice to Self-Represented Litigant Concerning Motion to Dismiss (McGrath, James)
April 3, 2024 Filing 26 Memorandum in Support re #25 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Seyfarth Shaw LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Bankruptcy Court Order, #2 Exhibit Superior Court Summary Judgment Order, #3 Affidavit Affidavit of Dallin R. Wilson)(McGrath, James)
April 3, 2024 Filing 25 MOTION to Dismiss by Seyfarth Shaw LLP.Responses due by 4/24/2024 (McGrath, James)
April 3, 2024 Filing 24 Disclosure Statement by Seyfarth Shaw LLP. (McGrath, James)
April 3, 2024 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by James C. McGrath on behalf of Seyfarth Shaw LLP (McGrath, James)
April 2, 2024 Answer deadline updated for MERS to 4/19/2024. (Johnson, D.)
April 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.'s consented-to motion for an extension of time until April 19, 2024 in which to file a response to the complaint (ECF No. #21 ) is granted Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 4/2/24. (Constantine, A.)
April 1, 2024 Filing 21 MOTION for Extension of Time until April 19, 2024 To Respond to Complaint by MERS. (Higgins, Sean)
April 1, 2024 Filing 20 Disclosure Statement by MERS identifying Corporate Parent MERSCORP Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Intercontinental Exchange, Inc., Corporate Parent ICE Mortgage Services, LLC, Corporate Parent ICE Mortgage Technology Holdings, Inc. for MERS. (Higgins, Sean)
April 1, 2024 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean R. Higgins on behalf of MERS (Higgins, Sean)
March 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: Defendant Fannie Mae has moved for an extension of time to file a responsive pleading. ECF No. #17 . The Court notes that the motion does not comply with Local Rule 7(b) because the motion fails to indicate that the movant has inquired of the plaintiff as to her position. See D. Conn. L. Civ. 7(b)(2). Nevertheless, the Court GRANTS the motion. Defendant Fannie Mae shall file a response to the complaint by April 19, 2024. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 3/25/24. (Constantine, A.)
March 25, 2024 Answer deadline updated for Fannie Mae to 4/19/2024. (Johnson, D.)
March 22, 2024 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time until April 19, 2024 to respond to Plaintiffs Complaint by Fannie Mae. (Milrad, Joshua)
March 22, 2024 Filing 16 Disclosure Statement by Fannie Mae. (Milrad, Joshua)
March 22, 2024 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Laurence Milrad on behalf of Fannie Mae (Milrad, Joshua)
March 20, 2024 Answer deadline updated for K L Gates PLLP to 4/19/2024; Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. to 4/19/2024; Wells Fargo Home Mortgage to 4/19/2024. (Johnson, D.)
March 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Defendants' motion (ECF No. #13 ) for an extension of time until April 19, 2024 in which to respond to the complaint is granted. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 3/20/24. (Constantine, A.)
March 15, 2024 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time until April 19, 2024 Respond to Complaint #1 Complaint by K L Gates PLLP, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Home Mortgage. (Higgins, Sean)
March 13, 2024 Filing 12 Disclosure Statement by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Home Mortgage identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Home Mortgage. (Higgins, Sean)
March 13, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean R. Higgins on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Home Mortgage (Higgins, Sean)
March 12, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean R. Higgins on behalf of K L Gates PLLP (Higgins, Sean)
March 4, 2024 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Brock Scott, Fannie Mae, K L Gates PLLP, MERS, Seyfarth Shaw LLP, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Home Mortgage* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. *Sandra Caldrello* *939 Pequot Ave* *New London, CT 06320*. (Ruocco, M.)
March 4, 2024 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Brock Scott, Fannie Mae, K L Gates PLLP, MERS, Seyfarth Shaw LLP, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Home Mortgage. (Ruocco, M.)
February 29, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE REGARDING SERVICE: The self-represented plaintiff shall proceed with service upon the defendant(s) pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and may refer to pages 8-11 of the Court's Guide for Self-Represented Parties found on our website here: https://www.ctd.uscourts.gov/rules-and-forms. If service is not effected by 5/29/2024, the case will be subject to dismissal. Dismissal due by 5/29/2024. Signed by Clerk on 2/29/2024.(Peterson, M)
February 29, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #5 Standing Protective Order, #1 Complaint filed by Sandra V. Caldrello, #6 Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction, 2 Notice re: Disclosure Statement, #4 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 02/27/2024. (Peterson, M)
February 27, 2024 Filing 6 Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. (Peterson, M)
February 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Standing Protective Order Signed by Judge Michael P Shea on 02/27/2024. (Peterson, M)
February 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P Shea on 02/27/2024. (Peterson, M)
February 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 4/27/2024. Discovery due by 8/28/2024. Dispositive Motions due by 10/2/2024. Signed by Clerk on 02/27/2024. (Peterson, M)
February 27, 2024 Filing 2 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 2/27/2024.(Chartier, A.)
February 27, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Brock Scott, Fannie Mae, K L Gates PLLP, Seyfarth Shaw LLP, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, filed by Sandra V. Caldrello.(Chartier, A.)
February 27, 2024 Filing fee received from Sandra V Caldrello: $ 405.00, receipt number 28286 (Chartier, A.)
February 27, 2024 Judge Michael P Shea and Judge Maria E. Garcia added. (Freberg, B)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caldrello v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brock Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Sean R. Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Home Mortgage
Represented By: Sean R. Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fannie Mae
Represented By: Joshua Laurence Milrad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bendett & McHugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seyfarth Shaw LLP
Represented By: James C. McGrath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K L Gates PLLP
Represented By: Sean R. Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MERS
Represented By: Sean R. Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra V. Caldrello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?