DePaul et al v. Kimberly-Clark Corporation
Plaintiff: BETHANY DePAUL, ARLENE QUARANTA and MEREDITH QUARANTA
Defendant: KIMBERLY-CLARK CORPORATION
Case Number: 3:2024cv00271
Filed: February 28, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Kari A Dooley
Referring Judge: Maria E Garcia
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Torts to Land
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 25, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2024 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Tracie Lynn Bryant on behalf of Kimberly-Clark Corporation (Bryant, Tracie)
April 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jennifer G. Levy. Signed by Clerk on 4/15/2024. (Fanelle, N.)
April 12, 2024 Filing 15 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jennifer G. Levy to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7721281) by Kimberly-Clark Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Jennifer G. Levy, #2 Exhibit Good Standing Certificate Jennifer G. Levy)(Gallagher, Robyn)
April 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Tracie L. Bryant. Signed by Clerk on 4/12/2024. (Fanelle, N.)
April 11, 2024 Filing 13 MOTION for Attorney(s) Tracie L. Bryant to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7719368) by Kimberly-Clark Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Tracie L. Bryant, #2 Exhibit Good Standing Certificate Bryant)(Gallagher, Robyn)
March 25, 2024 Answer deadline updated for Kimberly-Clark Corporation to 6/14/2024. (Gould, K.)
March 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant's time to respond to the Complaint is extended to June 14, 2024. This deadline shall not be further extended absent extraordinary and unforeseen circumstances. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 3/25/2024. (Haider, S)
March 22, 2024 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until June 14, 2024 Answer Complaint #1 Complaint by Kimberly-Clark Corporation. (Gallagher, Robyn)
March 22, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Robyn E. Gallagher on behalf of Kimberly-Clark Corporation (Gallagher, Robyn)
March 6, 2024 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Meredith Quaranta, Arlene Quaranta, Bethany DePaul. Kimberly-Clark Corporation served on 3/1/2024, answer due 3/22/2024. (Sloss, Ian)
March 1, 2024 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Kimberly-Clark Corporation* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Ian Wise Sloss* *Silver Golub & Teitell LLP* *One Landmark Square, 15th Floor* *Stamford, CT 06901*. (Fanelle, N.)
March 1, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #6 Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction, #5 Standing Protective Order, #1 Complaint filed by Bethany DePaul, Arlene Quaranta, Meredith Quaranta, #4 Electronic Filing Order, 2 Notice re: Disclosure Statement. Signed by Clerk on 3/1/2024. (Fanelle, N.)
February 28, 2024 Filing 6 Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. (Fanelle, N.)
February 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Standing Protective Order Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 2/28/2024. (Fanelle, N.)
February 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 2/28/2024. (Fanelle, N.)
February 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 4/28/2024 Discovery due by 8/29/2024 Dispositive Motions due by 10/3/2024 Signed by Clerk on 2/28/2024. (Fanelle, N.)
February 28, 2024 Filing 2 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 2/28/2024.(Maturo, F.)
February 28, 2024 Judge Kari A. Dooley and Judge Maria E. Garcia added. (Freberg, B)
February 28, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against KIMBERLY-CLARK CORPORATION ( Filing fee $405 receipt number ACTDC-7664764.), filed by MEREDITH QUARANTA, ARLENE QUARANTA, BETHANY DePAUL. (Attachments: #1 COVER SHEET)(Sloss, Ian)
February 28, 2024 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to KIMBERLY-CLARK CORPORATION. (Sloss, Ian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DePaul et al v. Kimberly-Clark Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BETHANY DePAUL
Represented By: Ian Wise Sloss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ARLENE QUARANTA
Represented By: Ian Wise Sloss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MEREDITH QUARANTA
Represented By: Ian Wise Sloss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIMBERLY-CLARK CORPORATION
Represented By: Robyn E. Gallagher
Represented By: Tracie Lynn Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?