Robichaud v. O'Malley
Plaintiff: Nicole D Robichaud
Defendant: Martin O'Malley
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2024cv00304
Filed: March 6, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Thomas O Farrish
Referring Judge: Maria E Garcia
2 Judge: Michael P Shea
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of SSA Decision DIWC - Title II Worker or Child Claims
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 2, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 2, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance (Paperless filing) (Fernandez, Sixtina)
May 1, 2024 Filing 12 MOTION to Reverse the Decision of the Commissioner by Nicole D Robichaud. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A)Motions referred to Thomas O. Farrish(Ramos, Ivan)
April 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER. The Government having filed the administrative record on April 1, 2024, the Court hereby enters the following Scheduling Order: * Plaintiff shall file a motion to reverse and/or remand and supporting memorandum of law no later than, May 1, 2024.* Defendant shall then have until May 31, 2024 to file a motion to affirm or a motion for voluntary remand.* Within 14 days after Defendant files its motion, Plaintiff may file a reply pursuant to Local Rule 7(d). Prior to the filing of any dispositive motions, the parties are encouraged to confer regarding the merits of the case in an effort to determine whether a reversal and voluntary remand are appropriate. The Court reminds the parties of the previously filed Standing Order which sets forth page limits and form and content requirements for motions and supporting memoranda. In addition to complying with these requirements, memoranda should avoid boilerplate discussions of the governing legal standards as the Court is familiar with the standard of review and the sequential evaluation process employed in the analysis of Social Security disability applications. The parties should focus on informing the Court of relevant and controlling legal authority and applying it to the facts of this case. Motions filed by the parties must comply with the requirements set forth above, in the Standing Order, and in the Local Rules of Civil Procedure. Failure to comply may result in denial of the motion. Any motion for extension of a deadline must comply with the Social Security Standing Order and Local Rule 7(b)(2) and must be filed at least three (3) days before the existing deadline. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Farrish on 4/1/24.(Wood, R.)
April 1, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE by Martin O'Malley of filing of the Unofficial Text-Searchable Copy of the Certified Administrative Record (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Unofficial text-searchable copy of Certified Administrative Record)(Lechleitner, Andreea)
April 1, 2024 Filing 9 Social Security Transcripts. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Part Two, #2 Supplement Part Three, #3 Supplement Part Four, #4 Supplement Part Five, #5 Supplement Part Six, #6 Supplement Part Seven, #7 Supplement Part Eight, #8 Supplement Part Nine, #9 Supplement Part Ten, #10 Supplement Part Eleven)(Lechleitner, Andreea)
March 25, 2024 Filing 8 Absent consent to a Magistrate Judge, this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas O. Farrish for all purposes including issuing a Recommended Ruling. Signed by Judge Michael P Shea on 3/25/2024.(Maturo, F.)
March 7, 2024 Filing 7 Notice of New SSA Action: Electronic service of the complaint was made by the Clerk's Office upon the Social Security Office of General Counsel and the US Attorney's Office for the District of Connecticut. (Chartier, A.)
March 7, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Andreea Lechleitner on behalf of Martin O'Malley (Lechleitner, Andreea)
March 6, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE to Counsel: Due to privacy restrictions on social security cases, absent both a consent to electronic notice and an approved motion for efiling privileges, counsel must mail paper copies to self-represented litigants. Signed by Clerk on 3/6/2024.(Chartier, A.)
March 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P Shea on 3/6/2024.(Chartier, A.)
March 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Standing ORDER Re: Social Security Cases. Signed by Judge Michael P Shea on 3/6/2024.(Chartier, A.)
March 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Standing ORDER on Social Security Appeals. Signed by Judge Michael P Shea on 3/6/2024. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Chartier, A.)
March 6, 2024 Answer deadline updated for Martin O'Malley to 5/6/2024. (Chartier, A.)
March 6, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Martin O'Malley ( Filing fee $405 receipt number ACTDC-7673043.), filed by Nicole D Robichaud. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ramos, Ivan)
March 6, 2024 Judge Michael P Shea and Judge Maria E. Garcia added. (Oliver, T.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robichaud v. O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole D Robichaud
Represented By: Ivan A. Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin O'Malley
Represented By: Andreea Lechleitner
Represented By: Sixtina Fernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?