Gonzalez v. O'Malley
Plaintiff: Diana I. Gonzalez
Defendant: Martin O'Malley
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2024cv00385
Filed: March 19, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Maria E Garcia
Referring Judge: Michael P Shea
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of SSA Decision DIWC - Title II Worker or Child Claims
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2024 Filing 12 Consent MOTION to Remand to Agency by Martin O'Malley. (Fernandez, Sixtina)
May 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SUPPLEMENTAL SCHEDULING ORDER.The Government having filed the administrative record on May 16, 2024 the Court hereby enters the following Scheduling Order: Plaintiff shall file a motion to reverse and/or remand and supporting memorandum of law no later than June 15, 2024. Defendant shall then have until July 15, 2024 to file a motion to affirm or a motion for voluntary remand. Within 14 days after Defendant files its motion, Plaintiff may file a reply pursuant to Local Rule 7(d).Prior to the filing of any dispositive motions, the parties are encouraged to confer regarding the merits of the case in an effort to determine whether a reversal and voluntary remand are appropriate.The Court reminds the parties of the previously filed Standing Order which sets forth page limits and form and content requirements for motions and supporting memoranda. In addition to complying with these requirements, memoranda should avoid boilerplate discussions of the governing legal standards as the Court is familiar with the standard of review and the sequential evaluation process employed in the analysis of Social Security disability applications. The parties should focus on informing the Court of relevant and controlling legal authority and applying it to the facts of this case.Motions filed by the parties must comply with the requirements set forth above, in the Standing Order, and in the Local Rules of Civil Procedure. Failure to comply may result in denial of the motion.Any motion for extension of a deadline must comply with the Social Security Standing Order and Local Rule 7(b)(2) and must be filed at least three (3) days before the existing deadline.SO ORDERED at New Haven, Connecticut. Signed by Judge Maria E. Garcia on 5/17/24. (Esposito, A.)
May 16, 2024 Filing 10 Social Security Transcripts. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Part 2, #2 Exhibit Part 3, #3 Exhibit Part 4, #4 Exhibit Part 5, #5 Exhibit Part 6, #6 Exhibit Part 7, #7 Exhibit Part 8)(Fernandez, Sixtina)
March 25, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Sixtina Fernandez on behalf of Martin O'Malley (Fernandez, Sixtina)
March 21, 2024 Filing 8 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Diana I. Gonzalez, Martin O'Malley. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Maria E. Garcia. This matter has been transferred to a magistrate judge. All non-efiled submissions should be filed at the seat of court where the magistrate judge presides. The case number will remain the same, but must be followed by the magistrate judge's initials. Signed by Judge Michael P Shea on 3/21/2024.(Maturo, F.)
March 20, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE by Diana I. Gonzalez Notice, Consent & Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge (Ciccarillo, Dennis)
March 20, 2024 Filing 6 Notice of New SSA Action: Electronic service of the complaint was made by the Clerk's Office upon the Social Security Office of General Counsel and the US Attorney's Office for the District of Connecticut. (Chartier, A.)
March 19, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE to Counsel: Due to privacy restrictions on social security cases, absent both a consent to electronic notice and an approved motion for efiling privileges, counsel must mail paper copies to self-represented litigants. Signed by Clerk on 3/19/2024.(Chartier, A.)
March 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P Shea on 3/19/2024.(Chartier, A.)
March 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Standing ORDER Re: Social Security Cases. Signed by Judge Michael P Shea on 3/19/2024.(Chartier, A.)
March 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Standing ORDER on Social Security Appeals. Signed by Judge Michael P Shea on 3/19/2024. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Chartier, A.)
March 19, 2024 Answer deadline updated for Martin O'Malley to 5/19/2024. (Chartier, A.)
March 19, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Martin O'Malley ( Filing fee $405 receipt number ACTDC-7687316.), filed by Diana I. Gonzalez.(Ciccarillo, Dennis)
March 19, 2024 Judge Michael P Shea and Judge Maria E. Garcia added. (Freberg, B)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzalez v. O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana I. Gonzalez
Represented By: Dennis G. Ciccarillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin O'Malley
Represented By: Sixtina Fernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?