Staron Enterprises LTD v. Cincinnati Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Staron Enterprises LTD doing business as European Motorcars
Defendant: Cincinnati Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2024cv00576
Filed: April 3, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Kari A Dooley
Referring Judge: S Dave Vatti
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2024 Filing 22 REPLY to Response to #17 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Staron Enterprises LTD. (Valinsky, Nicholas)
May 24, 2024 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Valinsky on behalf of Staron Enterprises LTD (Valinsky, Nicholas)
May 14, 2024 Filing 20 Memorandum in Opposition re #17 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Roche, Paul)
May 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Plaintiff's deadline to respond to Defendant's #16 Motion to Dismiss is extend to fifteen days following the Court's ruling on Plaintiff's #17 Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 5/3/2024. (Alquesta, S)
May 2, 2024 Filing 18 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #16 MOTION to Dismiss until 15 days after ruling on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by Staron Enterprises LTD. (Parker, Eric)
April 25, 2024 Filing 17 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Staron Enterprises LTD.Responses due by 5/16/2024 (Parker, Eric)
April 22, 2024 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss by Cincinnati Insurance Company.Responses due by 5/13/2024 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Roche, Paul)
April 9, 2024 Filing 15 Disclosure Statement by Staron Enterprises LTD. (Robacynski, John)
April 8, 2024 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by John Joseph Robacynski on behalf of Staron Enterprises LTD (Robacynski, John)
April 5, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric S Parker on behalf of Staron Enterprises LTD (Attachments: #1 Appearance)(Parker, Eric)
April 4, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul G. Roche on behalf of Cincinnati Insurance Company (Roche, Paul)
April 4, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Notice (Other) filed by Cincinnati Insurance Company, #5 Notice (Other) filed by Cincinnati Insurance Company, #1 Notice of Removal filed by Cincinnati Insurance Company, #9 Standing Protective Order, 6 Notice re: Disclosure Statement, #10 Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction, #7 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #2 Notice (Other) filed by Cincinnati Insurance Company, #8 Electronic Filing Order. Signed by Clerk on 4/4/2024. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removed Cases) (Fanelle, N.)
April 3, 2024 Filing 10 Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. (Fanelle, N.)
April 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Standing Protective Order Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 4/3/2024. (Fanelle, N.)
April 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 4/3/2024. (Fanelle, N.)
April 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 6/2/2024 Discovery due by 10/3/2024 Dispositive Motions due by 11/7/2024 Signed by Clerk on 4/3/2024.(Fanelle, N.)
April 3, 2024 Filing 6 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 4/3/24.(Hushin, Z.)
April 3, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE by The Cincinnati Insurance Company to Counsel Local Rule 5b (Roche, Paul)
April 3, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE by The Cincinnati Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal of Pending Motions (Roche, Paul)
April 3, 2024 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement Corporate Disclosure by The Cincinnati Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Cincinnati Financial Corporation, Other Affiliate The Cincinnati Indemnity Company for The Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Roche, Paul)
April 3, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE by The Cincinnati Insurance Company Removal Statement (Roche, Paul)
April 3, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Cincinnati Insurance Company from Middlesex Superior Court Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ACTDC-7708324, filed by The Cincinnati Insurance Company.(Roche, Paul)
April 3, 2024 Judge Kari A. Dooley and Judge S. Dave Vatti added. (Freberg, B)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Staron Enterprises LTD v. Cincinnati Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Staron Enterprises LTD doing business as European Motorcars
Represented By: Eric S Parker
Represented By: John Joseph Robacynski
Represented By: Nicholas Valinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cincinnati Insurance Company
Represented By: Paul G. Roche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?