Tino v. Walmart Inc.
Plaintiff: Gina Tino
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Case Number: 3:2024cv00596
Filed: April 4, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Vernon D Oliver
Referring Judge: Robert M Spector
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Order. For the reasons set forth in the motion, the plaintiff's Motion for an Order directing the release of the plaintiff's treatment and evaluation records, including test data, raw data, and test scoring protocols is hereby GRANTED. As requested in the motion, this order includes the disclosure of raw and scaled scores, client/patient responses to test questions and stimuli, and psychologists' notes and recordings concerning client/patient statements and behavior during any examination. This information shall be disclosed subject to a protective order imposing the following conditions: (1) the parties and their counsel are prohibited from publishing the raw data and any corresponding test administration and scoring protocols to any third party, including at trial, without further order of this Court; (2) the raw data and corresponding test administration and scoring protocols shall not be circulated beyond those persons necessary for the prosecution and defense of this case, including expert witnesses retained by the parties; (3) any raw data and corresponding test administration and scoring protocols provided electronically shall be destroyed at the end of the case; and (4) any raw data and corresponding test administration and scoring protocols provided as physical copies shall be returned to the disclosing provider or entity. This motion is brought by agreement and stipulation of the parties and is granted without prejudice to reconsideration. Any objections to compliance should be filed within fourteen (14) days of service of the order. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Robert M. Spector on May 29, 2024. (Blickley, J)
May 28, 2024 Filing 27 NOTICE by Gina Tino Notice of Compliance (Casper, Stewart)
May 28, 2024 Filing 26 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert M. Spector: Discovery Conference held on 5/28/2024. 13 minutes (Court Reporter CourtSmart.) (Langello, N)
May 21, 2024 Filing 25 Docket Entry Correction: Replacement PDF added to #23 (Samson, J)
May 20, 2024 Filing 24 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. A Discovery Conference via Zoom is set for May 28, 2024 at 03:00 PM before Judge Robert M. Spector. NOTICE regarding hearing via Zoom: The Discovery Conference scheduled for May 28, 2024 at 3:00 PM will be conducted via Zoom. Call-in and Public Access Number: 1 646 828 7666Meeting ID: 160 747 5567 Meeting Password: 634184The Court will distribute the video link to the parties via email.Please note: Members of the public are permitted to join this hearing by audio only using the public access number above. Video participation is permitted by the parties and counsel only. This is in accordance with the remote access policies of the Judicial Conference of the United States, which governs the practices of the federal courts. All persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, screenshots, streaming, and rebroadcasting in any form, of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the court. (Blickley, J)
May 20, 2024 Set Deadlines: Discovery due by 7/1/2025; Status Reports due by 10/4/2024 and 3/7/2025 (Samson, J)
May 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties' Rule 26(f) Report #19 is approved as amended. Discovery is due by July 1, 2025. The parties shall take the first step to initiate any dispositive motion practice by June 27, 2025. Status reports due on October 4, 2024 and March 7, 2025. Please see the attached for additional deadlines.Signed by Judge Vernon D. Oliver on 5/19/2024.(Rogers, D) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/21/2024: #1 Replacement PDF) (Samson, J).
May 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Robert M. Spector for a ruling on #18 First MOTION for Order Release of Raw Data Order Signed by Judge Vernon D. Oliver on 5/16/2024.(Samson, J)
May 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER referring Motion for Order #18 to a Magistrate Judge. The Clerk is respectfully directed to assign this Motion to a Magistrate Judge for resolution of the subject motion. Signed by Judge Vernon D. Oliver on 5/15/2024.(Rogers, D)
May 3, 2024 Filing 20 ANSWER to #17 Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses. by Walmart Inc..(Springer, George)
May 2, 2024 Filing 19 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Casper, Stewart)
May 1, 2024 Filing 18 First MOTION for Order Release of Raw Data Order by Gina Tino. (Casper, Stewart)
April 16, 2024 Filing 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Gina Tino.(Casper, Stewart)
April 15, 2024 Filing 16 NOTICE by Walmart Inc. of Service of Court Orders in Removed Cases (Moran, Austin)
April 8, 2024 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Stewart M. Casper on behalf of Gina Tino (Casper, Stewart)
April 5, 2024 Filing 14 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #8 Notice of Appearance filed by Walmart Inc., #4 Answer to Complaint filed by Walmart Inc., #6 Notice (Other) filed by Walmart Inc., #1 Notice of Removal filed by Walmart Inc., #13 Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction, 9 Notice re: Disclosure Statement, #12 Standing Protective Order, #5 Notice (Other) filed by Walmart Inc., #3 Notice (Other) filed by Walmart Inc., #11 Electronic Filing Order, #10 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Walmart Inc., #7 Disclosure Statement filed by Walmart Inc. Signed by Clerk on 4/5/2024. (Attachments: #1 Standing order on removed cases)(Gaskins, A)
April 4, 2024 Set Deadline: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/18/2024. (Velez, F)
April 4, 2024 Filing 13 Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. (Gaskins, A)
April 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Standing Protective Order Signed by Judge Vernon D. Oliver on 4/4/2024.(Gaskins, A)
April 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Vernon D. Oliver on 4/4/2024.(Gaskins, A)
April 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 6/3/2024 Discovery due by 10/4/2024 Dispositive Motions due by 11/8/2024 Signed by Clerk on 4/4/2024.(Gaskins, A)
April 4, 2024 Filing 9 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 4/4/24.(Hushin, Z.)
April 4, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Austin Kelly Moran on behalf of Walmart Inc. (Moran, Austin)
April 4, 2024 Filing 7 Disclosure Statement by Walmart Inc.. (Springer, George)
April 4, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE by Walmart Inc. Statement Regarding Removed Case Per Local Standing Orders (Springer, George)
April 4, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE by Walmart Inc. Notice of Pending Motions (Springer, George)
April 4, 2024 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Walmart Inc..(Springer, George)
April 4, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE by Walmart Inc. Certificate of Filing Copy of Notice of Removal in State Court (Springer, George)
April 4, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by George C. Springer, Jr on behalf of Walmart Inc. (Springer, George)
April 4, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Walmart Inc. from Hartford, case number HHD-CV24-6181685-S. Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ACTDC-7709692, filed by Walmart Inc..(Springer, George)
April 4, 2024 Judge Vernon D. Oliver and Judge Robert M. Spector added. (Freberg, B)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tino v. Walmart Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gina Tino
Represented By: Stewart M. Casper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Represented By: Austin Kelly Moran
Represented By: George C. Springer, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?