Winsor v. Retail Data, LLC
Plaintiff: Malana Winsor
Defendant: Retail Data, LLC
Case Number: 3:2024cv00620
Filed: April 4, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Vernon D Oliver
Referring Judge: Robert A Richardson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101 Americans with Disabilities Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 23, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER. A Settlement Conference is scheduled in this case for June 21, 2024, at 9:30 AM. Please see the attached Settlement Conference Order for detailed instructions and deadlines. Signed by Judge Robert M. Spector on May 23, 2024.(Blickley, J)
May 23, 2024 Filing 29 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. A Settlement Conference via Zoom is set for June 21, 2024, at 09:30 AM before Judge Robert M. Spector. (Blickley, J)
May 23, 2024 Filing 28 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert M. Spector: A telephonic Pre-Settlement Conference was held on 5/23/2024. 9 minutes. (Blickley, J)
May 22, 2024 Set Deadlines: Discovery due by 2/3/2025; Status Reports due by 9/30/2024 and 2/18/2025 (Samson, J)
May 21, 2024 Filing 27 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. A Telephonic Pre-Settlement Conference is set for May 23, 2024, at 04:30 PM before Judge Robert M. Spector. A date for the settlement conference will be set during the telephone call. As the Court requires parties or their representatives with settlement authority to attend (in-person or by remote means) the settlement conference, counsel should obtain dates of unavailability from their clients over the next 60 days and have their own calendars available to aid in the scheduling. During the telephone call, counsel should be prepared to discuss what information needs to be exchanged and anything else that needs to be accomplished prior to the settlement conference for the discussions to be productive. Please use the following dial-in for this call: (877) 873-8017; Access Code: 7040261. (Blickley, J)
May 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 26 SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties' proposed scheduling order #24 is approved as amended. Initial disclosures pursuant to Rule 26(a)(1) must be exchanged by June 4, 2024. Discovery due by February 3, 2025. The parties shall take the first step to initiate any dispositive motion practice by February 18, 2025. Status reports due on September 30, 2024 and February 18, 2025. Please see the attached for additional deadlines. The parties also request an early settlement conference before a Magistrate Judge; a separate referral order shall issue.Signed by Judge Vernon D. Oliver on 5/21/2024.(Dao, J)
May 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Robert M. Spector to conduct a settlement conference. Signed by Judge Vernon D. Oliver on 5/21/2024.(Samson, J)
May 20, 2024 Filing 24 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Fox, Shawn)
May 15, 2024 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Shawn Randall Fox on behalf of Retail Data, LLC of Elizabeth P. Redpath (Fox, Shawn)
May 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Elizabeth P. Redpath.. Signed by Clerk on 5/3/2024. (Gaskins, A)
May 2, 2024 Filing 21 MOTION for Attorney(s) Elizabeth P. Redpath to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice by Retail Data, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Fox, Shawn)
May 1, 2024 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard J. Batzler on behalf of Retail Data, LLC (Batzler, Richard)
May 1, 2024 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #13 MOTION for Attorney(s) Richard J. Batzler to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7740892) by Retail Data, LLC. (Batzler, Richard)
May 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER. The motion #17 is DENIED for failure to conform to Local Rule 83.1(d)(1)(b) (The motion shall be accompanied by an affidavit, duly sworn and executed by the proposed visiting attorney: identifying the bar of each court of which said attorney is and has ever been a member, and the corresponding bar identification number(s); or if no such numbers have been assigned, so stating.). The motion can be re-filed in accordance with the Local Rule. Signed by Judge Vernon D. Oliver on 5/1/2024. (Gaskins, A)
April 30, 2024 Filing 17 MOTION for Attorney(s) Elizabeth P. Redpath to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7743334) by Retail Data, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Fox, Shawn)
April 30, 2024 Filing 16 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Malana Winsor. (Cicchiello, Lorenzo)
April 30, 2024 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Lorenzo J. Cicchiello on behalf of Malana Winsor (Cicchiello, Lorenzo)
April 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Richard J. Batzler. Certificate of Good Standing due by 6/29/2024. Signed by Clerk on 4/20/2024. (Gaskins, A)
April 29, 2024 Filing 13 MOTION for Attorney(s) Richard J. Batzler to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7740892) by Retail Data, LLC. (Fox, Shawn)
April 15, 2024 Set Deadlines: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/18/2024 (Samson, J)
April 11, 2024 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Retail Data, LLC.(Fox, Shawn)
April 11, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE by Retail Data, LLC re #2 Notice of Removal, Removal Statement (Fox, Shawn)
April 8, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Notice (Other) filed by Retail Data, LLC, 4 Notice re: Disclosure Statement, #8 Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction, #5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Disclosure Statement filed by Retail Data, LLC, #9 Notice, #7 Standing Protective Order, #2 Notice of Removal, filed by Retail Data, LLC, #6 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 4/4/2024. (Attachments: #1 Standing order on removed cases)(Gaskins, A)
April 4, 2024 Filing 9 Notice re Initial Discovery Protocols Signed by Clerk on 4/4/2024. (Attachments: #1 Initial Discovery Protocols Attachment)(Gaskins, A)
April 4, 2024 Filing 8 Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. (Gaskins, A)
April 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Standing Protective Order Signed by Judge Vernon D. Oliver on 4/4/2024.(Gaskins, A)
April 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Vernon D. Oliver on 4/4/2024.(Gaskins, A)
April 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 6/3/2024 Discovery due by 10/4/2024 Dispositive Motions due by 11/8/2024 Signed by Clerk on 4/4/2024.(Gaskins, A)
April 4, 2024 Filing 4 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 4/4/2024.(Perez, J.)
April 4, 2024 Judge Vernon D. Oliver and Judge Robert A. Richardson added. (Oliver, T.)
April 4, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE by Retail Data, LLC of Pending Motions (Fox, Shawn)
April 4, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Retail Data, LLC from Superior Court for the Judicial District of Windham at Putnam, case number WWM-CV24-6029016-S. Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ACTDC-7711512, filed by Retail Data, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Fox, Shawn)
April 4, 2024 Filing 1 Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1 Financial Interest Disclosure by Retail Data, LLC. (Fox, Shawn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Winsor v. Retail Data, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malana Winsor
Represented By: John Erich Sheer
Represented By: Lorenzo J. Cicchiello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Retail Data, LLC
Represented By: Shawn Randall Fox
Represented By: Richard J. Batzler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?