Pascale et al v. Scheier
Plaintiff: Charles Pascale and Jessica Pascale
Defendant: Donald Scheier
Case Number: 3:2024cv00859
Filed: May 13, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Kari A Dooley
Referring Judge: Maria E Garcia
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2024 JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Imbriani, S)
June 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RE: #9 Motion to Withdraw; #10 Motion to Withdraw. These motions are construed as Notices of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i). The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 6/26/2024. (Haider, S)
June 24, 2024 Filing 10 MOTION to Withdraw by Jessica Pascale. (Westcott, William)
June 24, 2024 Filing 9 MOTION to Withdraw by Charles Pascale. (Westcott, William)
May 14, 2024 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Donald Scheier* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *William B. Westcott* *Maya Murphy, P.C.* *266 Post Road East* *Westport, CT 06880*. (Imbriani, S)
May 14, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, 2 Notice re: Disclosure Statement, #5 Standing Protective Order, #6 Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction, #4 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint filed by Charles Pascale Signed by Clerk on 5/14/2024.(Imbriani, S)
May 13, 2024 Filing 6 Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction.(Imbriani, S)
May 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Standing Protective Order Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 5/13/2024.(Imbriani, S)
May 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 5/13/2024.(Imbriani, S)
May 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/12/2024, Discovery due by 11/12/2024, Dispositive Motions due by 12/17/2024. Signed by Clerk on 5/13/2024.(Imbriani, S)
May 13, 2024 Filing 2 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 5/13/2024.(Maturo, F.)
May 13, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Donald Scheier ( Filing fee $405 receipt number BCTDC-7759082.), filed by Charles Pascale, Jessica Pascale.(Westcott, William) Modified on 5/13/2024 to correct parties (Maturo, F.).
May 13, 2024 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Westcott, William)
May 13, 2024 Judge Kari A. Dooley and Judge Maria E. Garcia added. (Freberg, B)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pascale et al v. Scheier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Pascale
Represented By: William B. Westcott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Pascale
Represented By: William B. Westcott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Scheier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?