In re: Intel Corporation Featured Case
Defendant: Avnet, Inc. and Clerk Jeffery N. Luthi
Petitioner: The National Plaintiffs Group
Intervenor Plaintiff: Phil Paul
3Rd Party Defendant: Apple Inc. and Ingram Micro Inc.
Not Yet Classified: Nancy Wolfe, Charles Dupraz, Brian Weiner, Melissa Armbrister, Bill Richards, Dana F. Thibedeau, Michael E. Ludt, JWRE Inc., Stuart Schupler, James R. Conley, Lazio Family Products, Jay Salpeter, Ronald Konieczka, Matthew Kravitz, Gideon Elliott, Henry Kornegay, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc., John Maita, Huston Frazier, Maria I. Prohias, Jim Kidwell, Michael Brauch, Leslie March, Jerome Feitelberg, Russell Dennis, Lawrence Lang, Michael H. Roach, Ian Walker, Richard Caplan, Kathy Ann Chapman, Carl Yamaguchi, Damon DiMarco, Benjamin Allanoff, Patricia M. Niehaus, DDS, PC Melinda Harr, Steve J. Hamilton, Caresse Harms, Carl Cunningham, Tom Hobbs, Athan Uwakwe, Nir Goldman, Jeanne Cook Frazier, Clerk Michael J. Beck, Mark Anthony, Joseph Samuel Cone, Peter Jon Naigow, HP Consulting Services Inc., Andrew Marcus, Sonia Yaco, Bergerson & Associates Inc., Cammy Nelson, Jose Juan, Marvin D. Chance, Jr., Robert J. Rainwater, Virginia Deering, Elizabeth Bruderle Baran, Major League Softball Inc., Paul Ramos, Harman Press, Vanessa Z. DeGeorge, Giacobbe-Fritz Fine Art LLC, Gabriella Herroeder-Perras, Fairmont Orthopedics & Sports Medicine P A, Michael K. Simon, Ron Terranova, Robin S. Weeth, Angel Genese, Beth Fink, Paul Roth, Cheryl Glick-Salpeter, Melissa Goeke, Lee Pines, Lena K. Manyin, Jodi Salpeter, Kevin Stoltz, Leonard Lorenzo, Raphael Allison, David Kurzman, Nathaniel Schwartz, Carrol Cowan, David Arnold, Ryan James Volden, Jeff Vaught, Seiniger Law Offices PA, Andrew S. Cohn, Susan Baxley, Andrew Armbrister, Cory Wiles, Karol Juskiewicz, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha, Paul C. Czysz, David E. Lipton, Dressed to Kill Custom Draperies LLC, Darice Russ, BEA Systems Inc., Law Offices of Laurel Stanley, Paula Nardella, Nancy Bjork, Patrick J. Hewson, Andrew Meimes, Stuart Munson, William F. Cronin, Trotter-Vogel Realty Inc., Tracy Kinder, Phillip Boeding, Maria Pilar Salgado, Mary Reeder, Shanghai 1930 Restaurant Partners L.P., Michael Ruccolo, Edward Rush, Christian Ambruoso, Jason Craig, Justin Suarez, Robert Marshall, AMD International Sales & Service LTD, Ludy A. Chacon, Law Office of Kwasi Asiedu, Chrystal Moeller, Ficor Acquisition Co LLC, Maria Griffin and Dwight E. Dickerson
Intervenor: Dow Jones & Co., Inc., Computer & Communications Industry Association, New York Times Company, The Washington Post, Union Federale Des Consommateurs - Que Choisir and The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press
Special Master: SPECIAL MASTER Vincent J. Poppiti, -SM-
In Re: Intel Corporation
Case Number: 1:2005md01717
Filed: November 9, 2005
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:2
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 25, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2017 Filing 2651 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT of the following sealed documents, signed on behalf of Adam Balick : D.I. # 1349, 1354, 1434, 1546, 1592, 1756 (jcs)
April 18, 2017 Filing 2650 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT of the following sealed documents, signed on behalf of J. Clayton Athey : D.I. # 464, 560, 583, 610, 632, 642, 719, 917, 1563, 1564, 1600, 1613, 1615, 1661, 1871, 1895, 1924, 1991, 2016, 2017, 2018, 2020, 2025, 2026, 2027, 2028, 2069, 2070, 2071, 2073, 2074,2248,2292, 2923, 2297, 2298, 2299, 2300, 2301, 2326, 2393, 2397, 2402, 2428, 2429, 2430, 2431, 2432, 2433, 2434, 2441, 2455, 2463, 2470, 2072, 2477, 2524, 2579, 2580 (jcs) (Main Document 2650 replaced on 4/21/2017) (jcs). Modified on 4/21/2017 (jcs).
April 13, 2017 Filing 2649 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT of the following sealed documents, signed on behalf of Frederick L. Cottrell, III : D.I. # 333, 338, 767, 872, 898, 927, 930, 946, 1023, 1086, 1087, 1168, 1169, 1210, 1229, 1243, 1365, 1366, 1442, 1446, 1449, 1450, 1451, 1493, 1502, 1511, 1512, 1513, 1514, 1516, 1533, 1535, 1537, 1552, 1553, 1554, 1585, 1656, 1660, 1723, 1724, 1725, 1726, 1783, 1801, 1802, 1809, 1835, 1838, 1839, 1903, 1904, 1948, 1949, 1950, 1951, 1952, 1953, 1954, 1955, 1956, 1982, 1983, 1996, 2049, 2057, 2083, 2110,2111,2118,2119, 2135, 2160, 2171, 2172, 2193, 2194, 2195, 2196, 2224, 2225, 2226 (jcs)
April 13, 2017 Filing 2648 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT of the following sealed documents, signed on behalf of Richard L. Horwitz : D.I. # 442, 448, 495, 513, 519, 526, 527, 537, 541, 547, 559, 587,588, 677, 775, 857, 896, 897, 830, 1054, 1099, 1100, 1153, 1230, 1245, 1246, 1247, 1248, 1249, 1250, 1251, 1252, 1255, 1256, 1257, 1325, 1326, 1364, 1444, 1445, 1569, 1571, 1608, 1609, 1674, 1666, 1712, 1717, 1739, 1760, 1761, 1792, 1816, 1833, 1879, 1892, 1893, 1894, 1901, 1902, 1958, 1959, 1667, 1980, 1981, 1984, 2048, 2085, 2086, 2102, 2103, 2106, 2107, 2121, 2122, 2156, 2168, 2169, 2170, 2173, 2174, 2178, 2179, 2180, 2181, 2182, 2183, 2191, 2206, 2207, 2208, 2223, 2234, 2271, 2273, 2267, 2268, 2269, 2270, 2271, 2272, 2296, 2310, 2311, 2321, 2322, 2323, 2325, 2346, 2347, 2348, 2349, 2350, 2351, 2352, 2353, 2355, 2357, 2358, 2374, 2391, 2399, 2401, 2416, 2437, 2451, 2458, 2490, 2491, 2496, 2581 (jcs)
April 13, 2017 Filing 2647 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT of the following sealed documents, signed on behalf of Mary B. Graham : D.I. # 576, 578, 697 (jcs)
April 13, 2017 Filing 2646 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT of the following sealed documents, signed on behalf of Lauren E. Maguire : D.I. # 1916 (jcs)
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2645 ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING RETURN OF SEALED DOCUMENTS: Pursuant to the attached STANDING ORDER dated January 8, 2013, sealed documents identified on the highlighted docket sheet will be claimed by the FILING party/attorney no later than 4/27/2017. Filing attorney or their designee shall CLAIM their sealed documents by sending an E-MAIL, Subject: Return of Sealed Documents, to returnsealeddocs@ded.uscourts.gov, listing the case number and a contact's name, phone number and address. Parties not registered in CM/ECF may call our Help Desk at 302-573-6170 to claim their sealed documents. Once sealed documents are claimed, THE CLERK SHALL prepare receipts and contact filers WHEN THEIR DOCUMENTS ARE READY FOR PICK-UP at the Clerk's Office, 844 N. King Street, Intake Help Desk, Room 4209. Documents not claimed shall be unsealed and handled pursuant to the standing order.. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/8/2013. (Attachments: #1 Highlighted Docket Sheet)(jcs)
September 23, 2015 CASE CLOSED (ntl)
September 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2644 ORDER OF DISMISSAL AND FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/17/15. Associated Cases: 1:05-cv-00485-LPS, 1:05-md-01717-LPS (ntl)
September 15, 2015 Filing 2643 STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint Stipulation of Dismissal by Phil Paul. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order of Dismissal and Final Judgment)(Athey, J.)
September 4, 2015 Filing 2642 REDACTED VERSION of (2639 in 1:05-md-01717-LPS, 2235 in 1:05-cv-00485-LPS) Status Report (Joint) by Intel Corporation. (Horwitz, Richard)
September 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2641 ORDER Setting Deadline for Submission of Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/4/15. Associated Cases: 1:05-cv-00485-LPS, 1:05-md-01717-LPS (ntl)
September 1, 2015 Filing 2640 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from J. Clayton Athey regarding Enclosing a Proposed Form of Order Setting the Deadline for the Parties' Submission of a Stipulation of Dismissal. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Athey, J.)
August 31, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark - Telephone Conference held on 8/31/2015. (Court Reporter B. Gaffigan.) Associated Cases: 1:05-cv-00485-LPS, 1:05-md-01717-LPS (ntl)
August 28, 2015 Filing 2639 [SEALED] Joint STATUS REPORT by Intel Corporation. (Horwitz, Richard)
August 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2638 ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall provide a joint status report no later than August 28, 2015 and the Court will hold a status teleconference on August 31, 2015 at 2:30 p.m. Plaintiffs' counsel shall arrange the call to (302) 573-4573. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/10/15. Associated Cases: 1:05-cv-00485-LPS, 1:05-md-01717-LPS (ntl)
June 17, 2015 Filing 2637 REDACTED VERSION of (2636 in 1:05-md-01717-LPS, 2232 in 1:05-cv-00485-LPS) Status Report by Intel Corporation. (Horwitz, Richard)
June 10, 2015 Filing 2636 [SEALED] Joint STATUS REPORT Pursuant to the Court's June 2, 2015 Order by Phil Paul. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Athey, J.)
June 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2635 ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall submit a joint status report no later than June 10, 2015.ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 6/2/15. Associated Cases: 1:05-cv-00485-LPS, 1:05-md-01717-LPS (ntl)
May 11, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (2634 in 1:05-md-01717-LPS) (2230 in 1:05-cv-00485-LPS) Stipulation and Order Extending Temporary Stay. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/11/15. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-LPS, 1:05-cv-00485-LPS (ntl)
May 7, 2015 Filing 2634 STIPULATION Stipulation and Order Extending Temporary Stay re SO ORDERED by Intel Corporation. (Athey, J.)
April 21, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (2633 in 1:05-md-01717-LPS, 2229 in 1:05-cv-00485-LPS) Stipulation and Order extending temporary stay. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/21/15. Associated Cases: 1:05-cv-00485-LPS, 1:05-md-01717-LPS (ntl)
April 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2633 STIPULATION and Order Extending Temporary Stay re SO ORDERED, Case Stayed by Phil Paul. (Athey, J.)
April 1, 2015 Filing 2632 NOTICE of Change of Address by Richard L. Horwitz (Horwitz, Richard)
April 1, 2015 Filing 2632 NOTICE of Change of Address by Richard L. Horwitz (Horwitz, Richard)
March 17, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (2631 in 1:05-md-01717-LPS, 2227 in 1:05-cv-00485-LPS) Stipulation and Order for Temporary Stay -- Case Stayed for 30 days. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/17/15. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-LPS, 1:05-cv-00485-LPS (ntl)
March 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2631 STIPULATION and Order for Temporary Stay by Phil Paul. (Athey, J.)
March 4, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (2226 in 1:05-cv-00485-LPS, 2630 in 1:05-md-01717-LPS) Stipulation and Order modifying briefing schedule on Intel's motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/4/15. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-LPS, 1:05-cv-00485-LPS (ntl)
February 27, 2015 Filing 2630 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Modifying Briefing Schedule on Intel's Motion for Summary Judgment re (2618 in 1:05-md-01717-LPS) Order by Phil Paul. (Athey, J.)
February 13, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (2225 in 1:05-cv-00485-LPS, 2629 in 1:05-md-01717-LPS) Stipulation and Order modifying briefing schedule on Intel's motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 2/13/15. Associated Cases: 1:05-cv-00485-LPS, 1:05-md-01717-LPS (ntl)
February 10, 2015 Filing 2629 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Modifying Briefing Schedule on Intel's Motion for Summary Judgment re (2618 in 1:05-md-01717-LPS) Order by Phil Paul. (Athey, J.)
January 12, 2015 Filing 2628 REDACTED VERSION of (2626 in 1:05-md-01717-LPS) Declaration, (2222 in 1:05-cv-00485-LPS) Declaration, Public Version - Declaration of Sujal J. Shah in Support of Defendant Intel Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment on Individual Claims, with Exhibits 1-3 and Certificate of Service by Intel Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-3)(Horwitz, Richard)
January 12, 2015 Filing 2627 REDACTED VERSION of (2221 in 1:05-cv-00485-LPS) Opening Brief in Support, (2625 in 1:05-md-01717-LPS) Opening Brief in Support Public Version - Defendant Intel Corporation's Opening Brief in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment on Individual Claims, with Certificate of Service by Intel Corporation. (Horwitz, Richard)
December 29, 2014 Filing 2626 [SEALED] DECLARATION re # 2624 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Individual Claims (Declaration of Sujal J. Shah) by Intel Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 part 1, # 2 Exhibit 1 part 2, # 3 Exhibit 2-3)(Horwitz, Richard)
December 29, 2014 Filing 2625 [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re # 2624 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Individual Claims filed by Intel Corporation.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 1/15/2015. (Horwitz, Richard)
December 29, 2014 Filing 2624 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Individual Claims - filed by Intel Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Horwitz, Richard)
December 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2623 ORDER Setting Mediation Conference: A Telephone Conference is set for 1/5/2015 at 10:15 AM before Judge Christopher J. Burke. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 12/19/2014. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-LPS, 1:05-cv-00485-LPS(dlk)
December 16, 2014 Filing 2622 Letter to The Honorable Christopher J. Burke from J. Clayton Athey regarding Requesting an ADR Scheduling Conference Be Scheduled - re (2617 in 1:05-md-01717-LPS) Status Report, (2619 in 1:05-md-01717-LPS) Order Referring Case to Mediation,. (Athey, J.)
December 12, 2014 Filing 2621 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance of James L. Holzman as counsel for plaintiff Phil Paul by Phil Paul (Athey, J.)
November 25, 2014 Filing 2620 NOTICE of Change of Firm Affiliation by Intel Corporation (Horwitz, Richard)
November 14, 2014 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Christopher J. Burke for Mediation. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-LPS, 1:05-cv-00485-LPS(dlk)
November 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2619 ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher J. Burke, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b), for the purposes of exploring ADR. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 11/14/14. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-LPS, 1:05-cv-00485-LPS (ntl)
November 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2618 ORDER REGARDING FURTHER PROCEEDINGS (Briefing Schedule). Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 11/14/14. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-LPS, 1:05-cv-00485-LPS (ntl)
November 10, 2014 Filing 2617 Joint STATUS REPORT REGARDING FURTHER PROCEEDINGS by Intel Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Horwitz, Richard)
September 4, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (2212 in 1:05-cv-00485-LPS)(2616 in 05md1717) Joint Status Report Regarding Further Proceedings. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/4/14. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-LPS, 1:05-cv-00485-LPS (ntl)
August 29, 2014 Filing 2616 Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Further Proceedings by Phil Paul. (Athey, J.)
August 13, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (2211 in 1:05-cv-00485-LPS, 2615 in 1:05-md-01717-LPS) Stipulation and Order Regarding Time to File Joint Status Report filed by Phil Paul. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/12/14. Associated Cases: 1:05-cv-00485-LPS, 1:05-md-01717-LPS (ntl)
August 12, 2014 Filing 2615 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Regarding Time to File Joint Status Report by Phil Paul. (Athey, J.)
August 6, 2014 Filing 2614 REDACTED PUBLIC VERSION of # 2610 Memorandum Opinion. (ntl)
August 5, 2014 Filing 2613 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from J. Clayton Athey regarding the Court's July 31, 2014 Order and Intel's proposed redactions. (Athey, J.)
August 5, 2014 Filing 2612 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Richard L. Horwitz regarding submission of redactions to Courts Memorandum Order of July 31, 2014 - re (2206 in 1:05-cv-00485-LPS, 2610 in 1:05-md-01717-LPS) Memorandum Opinion. (Horwitz, Richard)
July 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2611 ORDER re (2206 in 1:05-cv-00485-LPS, 2610 in 1:05-md-01717-LPS) Memorandum Opinion -- 1. Plaintiffs' objections (D.I. 2078) to the special master's recommendation (D.I. 2073) regarding Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Dr. Keith Leffler (D.I. 1062) are SUSTAINED. Defendant's Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Dr. Keith Leffler (D.I. 1062) is DENIED. 2. Plaintiff's objections (D.I. 2078) to the special master's recommendation (D.I. 2073) regarding Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify a Class (D.I. 753) are OVERRULED. The special master's report and recommendation (D.I. 2073 at 50-91) with respect to Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify a Class is ADOPTED. Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify a Class (D.I. 753) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/31/14. Associated Cases: 1:05-cv-00485-LPS, 1:05-md-01717-LPS (ntl)
July 31, 2014 Filing 2610 [SEALED] MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/31/14.This order has been emailed to local counsel. Associated Cases: 1:05-cv-00485-LPS, 1:05-md-01717-LPS (ntl)
July 14, 2014 Filing 2609 NOTICE of of Withdrawal of Appearance of Laina M. Herbert by Phil Paul (Athey, J.)
June 9, 2014 Filing 2608 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Richard L. Horwitz regarding response to Class Plaintiffs' May 30, 2014 letter to the Court. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Horwitz, Richard)
May 30, 2014 Filing 2607 Letter to Honorable Leonard P. Stark from J. Clayton Athey regarding alerting the Court to two decisions that are relevant to the issues raised in Plaintiffs' pending class certification motion and Intel's Motion to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Keith Leffler - re (753 in 1:05-cv-00485-LPS) MOTION to Certify Class, (1062 in 1:05-cv-00485-LPS) MOTION to Preclude (Exclude) Testimony of Dr. Keith Leffler with Proposed Order and Certificate of Service attached . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Athey, J.)
November 13, 2013 Filing 2606 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Laina M. Herbert regarding enclosing a courtesy copy of a disc with Plaintiffs' Post-Hearing Opening Brief Regarding Class Certification which includes searchable hyperlinks. (Herbert, Laina)
November 1, 2013 Filing 2605 REDACTED VERSION of (2193 in 1:05-cv-00485-LPS) POST Trial Brief Public Version of Defendant Intel Corporations Post-Hearing Response Brief in Opposition to Class Certification, with Certificate of Service by Intel Corporation. (Horwitz, Richard)
October 30, 2013 Filing 2604 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Richard L. Horwitz regarding Enclosing courtesy copy of CD with Defendant Intel Corporation's Post-Hearing Response Brief in Opposition to Class Certification - re (2193 in 1:05-cv-00485-LPS, 2597 in 1:05-md-01717-LPS) POST Trial Brief. (Horwitz, Richard)
October 22, 2013 Filing 2603 REDACTED VERSION of (2194 in 1:05-cv-00485-LPS, 2598 in 1:05-md-01717-LPS) POST Trial Brief Regarding Class Certification by Phil Paul. (Holzman, James)
October 16, 2013 Filing 2602 REDACTED VERSION of (2191 in 1:05-cv-00485-LPS, 2595 in 1:05-md-01717-LPS) Amended Document, Public Version of Corrected Exhibit 82 to Declaration of Gregory F. Wells in Support of Defendant Intel Corporation's Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law, with Certificate of Service by Intel Corporation. (Horwitz, Richard)
October 16, 2013 Filing 2601 REDACTED VERSION of (2594 in 1:05-md-01717-LPS, 2190 in 1:05-cv-00485-LPS) Amended Document, Public Version of Defendant Intel Corporation's Corrected Post-Hearing Brief in Opposition to Class Certification, with Certificate of Service by Intel Corporation. (Horwitz, Richard)
October 16, 2013 Filing 2600 REDACTED VERSION of (2189 in 1:05-cv-00485-LPS, 2593 in 1:05-md-01717-LPS) Amended Document, Public Version of Defendant Intel Corporation's Corrected Updated Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law Relating to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, with Certificate of Service by Intel Corporation. (Horwitz, Richard)
October 16, 2013 Filing 2599 REDACTED VERSION of (2592 in 1:05-md-01717-LPS, 2188 in 1:05-cv-00485-LPS) Statement, Public Version of Statement of Errata, with Certificate of Service by Intel Corporation. (Horwitz, Richard)
October 15, 2013 Filing 2598 [SEALED] POST TRIAL BRIEF Plaintiffs' Post-Hearing Response Brief Regarding Class Certification by Phil Paul. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Athey, J.)
October 15, 2013 Filing 2597 [SEALED] POST TRIAL BRIEF - Defendant Intel Corporation's Post-Hearing Response Brief in Opposition to Class Certification, with Certificate of Service (FILED UNDER SEAL) by Intel Corporation. (Horwitz, Richard)
October 10, 2013 Filing 2596 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Richard L. Horwitz regarding Enclosure of CD containing copies of Post Trial Briefing - re # 2593 Amended Document, # 2594 Amended Document,. (Horwitz, Richard)
October 9, 2013 Filing 2595 [SEALED] AMENDED DOCUMENT by Intel Corporation. Amendment to (2581 in 1:05-md-01717-LPS) Appendix, (2177 in 1:05-cv-00485-LPS) Appendix, (2167 in 1:05-cv-00485-LPS, 2571 in 1:05-md-01717-LPS) Declaration, SEALED Corrected Exhibit 82 to Declaration of Gregory F. Wells in Support of Defendant Intel Corporation's Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law, with Certificate of Service . (Horwitz, Richard)
October 9, 2013 Filing 2594 [SEALED] AMENDED DOCUMENT by Intel Corporation. Amendment to (2165 in 1:05-cv-00485-LPS, 2569 in 1:05-md-01717-LPS) POST Trial Brief SEALED Defendant Intel Corporation's Corrected Post-Hearing Brief in Opposition to Class Certification, with Certificate of Service . (Horwitz, Richard)
October 9, 2013 Filing 2593 [SEALED] AMENDED DOCUMENT by Intel Corporation. Amendment to (2570 in 1:05-md-01717-LPS, 2166 in 1:05-cv-00485-LPS) Proposed Findings of Fact - SEALED Defendant Intel Corporation's Corrected Updated Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law Relating to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, with Certificate of Service . (Horwitz, Richard)
October 9, 2013 Filing 2592 [SEALED] STATEMENT re (2581 in 1:05-md-01717-LPS) Appendix, (2570 in 1:05-md-01717-LPS, 2166 in 1:05-cv-00485-LPS) Proposed Findings of Fact, (2177 in 1:05-cv-00485-LPS) Appendix, (2165 in 1:05-cv-00485-LPS, 2569 in 1:05-md-01717-LPS) POST Trial Brief - SEALED Statement of Errata, with Certificate of Service by Intel Corporation. (Horwitz, Richard)
September 25, 2013 Filing 2591 REDACTED VERSION of (2581 in 1:05-md-01717-LPS) Appendix, (2177 in 1:05-cv-00485-LPS) Appendix - PUBLIC VERSION of Exhibits to Declaration of Gregory F. Wells In Support Of Defendant Intel Corporation's Proposed Findings Of Fact And Conclusions Of Law, Volumes I through VII (Exhibit 1-205), with Certificate of Service by Intel Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Volume II (Exhibits 26-59) (Part 1 of 2), # 2 Volume II (Part 2 of 2), # 3 Volume III (Exhibits 60-81), # 4 Volume IV (Exhibits 82-124), # 5 Volume V (Exhibits 125-160), # 6 Volume VI (Exhibits 161-194), # 7 Volume VII (Exhibits 195-205) (Part 1 of 8), # 8 Volume VII (Part 2 of 8), # 9 Volume VII (Part 3 of 8), # 10 Volume VII (Part 4 of 8), # 11 Volume VII (Part 5 of 8), # 12 Volume VII (Part 6 of 8), # 13 Volume VII (Part 7 of 8), # 14 Volume VII (Part 8 of 8))(Horwitz, Richard)
September 25, 2013 Filing 2590 REDACTED VERSION of (2167 in 1:05-cv-00485-LPS, 2571 in 1:05-md-01717-LPS) Declaration, PUBLIC VERSION Declaration of Gregory F. Wells In Support Of Defendant Intel Corporation's Proposed Findings Of Fact And Conclusions Of Law, with Exhibit A and Certificate of Service by Intel Corporation. (Horwitz, Richard)
September 24, 2013 Filing 2589 REDACTED VERSION of (2579 in 1:05-md-01717-LPS) Appendix, (2175 in 1:05-cv-00485-LPS) Appendix Declaration of Patrick W. Flavin Filing and Presenting Exhibits and Deposition Testimony Previously Designated by Plaintiffs or Cited in Plaintiffs' Class Certification Filings, Expert Reports and Related Submissions But Not Previously Docketed by Phil Paul. (Herbert, Laina)
September 24, 2013 Filing 2588 REDACTED VERSION of (2173 in 1:05-cv-00485-LPS, 2577 in 1:05-md-01717-LPS) Declaration,, (2573 in 1:05-md-01717-LPS, 2169 in 1:05-cv-00485-LPS) POST Trial Brief Declaration of Patrick W. Flavin Filing and Presenting Exhibits and Deposition Testimony Previously Designated by Plaintiffs or Cited in Plaintiffs' Class Certification Filings, Expert Reports and Related Submissions But Not Previously Docketed by Phil Paul. (Herbert, Laina)
September 24, 2013 Filing 2587 REDACTED VERSION of (2176 in 1:05-cv-00485-LPS) Appendix, (2580 in 1:05-md-01717-LPS) Appendix to the Declaration of Qianwei Fu by Phil Paul. (Herbert, Laina)
September 24, 2013 Filing 2586 REDACTED VERSION of (2575 in 1:05-md-01717-LPS, 2171 in 1:05-cv-00485-LPS) Declaration of Qianwei Fu by Phil Paul. (Herbert, Laina)
September 24, 2013 Filing 2585 REDACTED VERSION of (2574 in 1:05-md-01717-LPS, 2170 in 1:05-cv-00485-LPS) Proposed Findings of Fact by Phil Paul. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-G)(Herbert, Laina)
September 24, 2013 Filing 2584 REDACTED VERSION of (2570 in 1:05-md-01717-LPS, 2166 in 1:05-cv-00485-LPS) Proposed Findings of Fact - PUBLIC VERSION Defendant Intel Corporation's Updated Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law Relating to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, with Certificate of Service by Intel Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Part 2, # 2 Part 3, # 3 Part 4, # 4 Part 5, # 5 Part 6, # 6 Part 7)(Horwitz, Richard)
September 24, 2013 Filing 2583 REDACTED VERSION of (2573 in 1:05-md-01717-LPS, 2169 in 1:05-cv-00485-LPS) POST Trial Brief Regarding Class Certification by Phil Paul. (Herbert, Laina)
September 24, 2013 Filing 2582 REDACTED VERSION of (2165 in 1:05-cv-00485-LPS, 2569 in 1:05-md-01717-LPS) POST Trial Brief - PUBLIC VERSION Defendant Intel Corporation's Post-Hearing Brief In Opposition to Class Certification, with Certificate of Service by Intel Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Part 2)(Horwitz, Richard)
September 20, 2013 Filing 2581 [SEALED] EXHIBITS 1-205 (Volumes I to VII) to # 2571 Declaration of Gregory F. Wells re # 2569 POST Hearing Brief, # 2570 Proposed Findings of Fact, # 2572 Notice of Filing Paper Documents by Intel Corporation. (ntl)
September 18, 2013 Filing 2580 [SEALED] EXHIBITS to # 2575 Declaration of Qianwei Fu re # 2576 Notice of Paper Filing, # 2573 POST Hearing Brief, # 2574 Proposed Findings of Fact by Phil Paul. (ntl)
September 18, 2013 Filing 2579 [SEALED] EXHIBITS to # 2577 Declaration of Patrick W. Flavin re # 2573 POST Hearing Brief, # 2574 Proposed Findings of Fact, # 2578 Notice of Filing Paper Documents by Phil Paul. (ntl)
September 17, 2013 Filing 2578 NOTICE of filing the following document(s) in paper format: Sealed Exhibits to Declaration of Patrick W. Flavin Filing and Presenting Exhibits and Deposition Testimony Previously Designated by Plaintiffs or Cited in Plaintiffs' Class Certification Filings, Expert Reports and Related Submissions But Not Previously Docketed. Original document(s) to be filed with the Clerk's Office. Notice filed by J. Clayton Athey on behalf of Phil Paul (Athey, J.)
September 17, 2013 Filing 2577 [SEALED] DECLARATION re (2573 in 1:05-md-01717-LPS, 2169 in 1:05-cv-00485-LPS) POST Trial Brief, (2574 in 1:05-md-01717-LPS, 2170 in 1:05-cv-00485-LPS) Proposed Findings of Fact Declaration of Patrick W. Flavin Filing and Presenting Exhibits and Deposition Testimony Previously Designated by Plaintiffs or Cited in Plaintiffs' Class Certification Filings, Expert Reports and Related Submissions But Not Previously Docketed by Phil Paul. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Athey, J.)
September 17, 2013 Filing 2576 NOTICE of Notice of Paper Filing With the Clerk's Office of Sealed Exhibit Tabs 1-97 to Declaration of Qianwei Fu in Support of Class Plaintiffs' Proposed Finding of Facts and Conclusions of Law and Plaintiffs' Post-Hearing Opening Brief Regarding Class Certification by Phil Paul (Athey, J.)
September 17, 2013 Filing 2575 [SEALED] DECLARATION re (2573 in 1:05-md-01717-LPS) POST Trial Brief, (2574 in 1:05-md-01717-LPS) Proposed Findings of Fact of Qianwei Fu by Phil Paul. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Athey, J.)
September 17, 2013 Filing 2574 [SEALED] Proposed Findings of Fact by Phil Paul. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-D, # 2 Exhibits E-F, # 3 Exhibit G, # 4 Certificate of Service)(Athey, J.)
September 17, 2013 Filing 2573 [SEALED] POST TRIAL BRIEF Regarding Class Certification by Phil Paul. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Athey, J.)
September 17, 2013 Filing 2572 NOTICE of filing the following document(s) in paper format: SEALED Exhibits 1-205 to Declaration of Gregory F. Wells in Support of Defendant Intel Corporation's Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law (Volumes I through VII, Exhibits 1-205). Original document(s) to be filed with the Clerk's Office. Notice filed by Richard L. Horwitz on behalf of Intel Corporation (Horwitz, Richard)
September 17, 2013 Filing 2571 [SEALED] DECLARATION re (2570 in 1:05-md-01717-LPS, 2166 in 1:05-cv-00485-LPS) Proposed Findings of Fact - SEALED Declaration of Gregory F. Wells in Support of Defendant Intel Corporation's Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law, with Exhibit A and Certificate of Service by Intel Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Redline of Intel Corporation's Updated Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law))(Horwitz, Richard)
September 17, 2013 Filing 2570 [SEALED] Proposed Findings of Fact by Intel Corporation. (Horwitz, Richard)
September 17, 2013 Filing 2569 [SEALED] POST TRIAL BRIEF - SEALED Defendant Intel Corporations Post-Hearing Brief in Opposition to Class Certification, with Certificate of Service by Intel Corporation. (Horwitz, Richard)
September 13, 2013 CORRECTING ENTRY: Attorneys Richard A. Ripley and Gregory F. Wells added to list of individuals "SO ORDERED" as admitted pro hac vice on August 15, 2007 docket entry. (rpg)
August 22, 2013 Filing 2568 Official Transcript of Evidentiary Hearing - Volume C held on July 18, 2013 before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Brian P. Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/12/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/23/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/20/2013. (bpg)
August 22, 2013 Filing 2567 Official Transcript of Evidentiary Hearing - Volume B held on July 17, 2013 before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Brian P. Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/12/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/23/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/20/2013. (bpg)
August 22, 2013 Filing 2566 Official Transcript of Evidentiary Hearing - Volume A held on July 16, 2013 before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Brian P. Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/12/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/23/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/20/2013. (bpg)
August 21, 2013 Filing 2565 NOTICE of Change of Law Firm Affiliation and Cerificate of Service by Robert Marshall (McNew, R.)
August 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 2564 AMENDED ORDER REGARDING POST-HEARING BRIEFING. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/19/13. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-LPS, 1:05-cv-00485-LPS(ntl)
August 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 2563 ORDER REGARDING POST-HEARING BRIEFING. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/19/13. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-LPS, 1:05-cv-00485-LPS(ntl)
August 16, 2013 Filing 2562 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Richard L. Horwitz, Esquire regarding Class Certificate hearing and enclosure of demonstratives. (Horwitz, Richard)
August 16, 2013 Filing 2561 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Laina M. Herbert regarding Enclosing Class Plaintiffs Opening Presentation Slides and Evidence Cited in the Slides. (Herbert, Laina)
August 8, 2013 Filing 2560 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from J. Clayton Athey and Richard L. Horwitz regarding post-hearing briefing schedule. (Attachments: # 1 Order Regarding Post-hearing Briefing)(Athey, J.)
July 18, 2013 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark - Evidentiary Hearing (Day 3) held on 7/18/2013. (Court Reporter B. Gaffigan.) Associated Cases: 1:05-cv-00485-LPS, 1:05-md-01717-LPS(ntl)
July 17, 2013 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark - Evidentiary Hearing (Day 2) held on 7/17/2013. (Court Reporters: B. Gaffigan, K. Maurer) Associated Cases: 1:05-cv-00485-LPS, 1:05-md-01717-LPS(ntl)
July 16, 2013 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark - Evidentiary Hearing (Day 1) held on 7/16/2013. (Court Reporters: B. Gaffigan, K. Maurer) Associated Cases: 1:05-cv-00485-LPS, 1:05-md-01717-LPS(ntl)
July 16, 2013 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Eric P. Mandel for Phil Paul added for electronic noticing. (dmp, )
July 16, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (2553 in 1:05-md-01717-LPS, 2150 in 1:05-cv-00485-LPS) Pre-Hearing Stipulation and Order filed by Intel Corporation. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/16/13. Associated Cases: 1:05-cv-00485-LPS, 1:05-md-01717-LPS(ntl)
July 15, 2013 Filing 2559 [SEALED] EXHIBIT re (2155 in 1:05-cv-00485-LPS) Respone to Objections, - SEALED Exhibit A to Defendant Intel Corporation's Response to Plaintiffs' Objections to Intel's Deposition Counter-Designations, with Certificate of Service by Intel Corporation. (Horwitz, Richard)
July 15, 2013 Filing 2558 RESPONSE TO OBJECTIONS by Intel Corporation re (2152 in 1:05-cv-00485-LPS) Objections, - Defendant Intel Corporation's Response to Plaintiffs' Objections to Intel's Deposition Counter-Designations, with Certificate of Service . (Horwitz, Richard)
July 15, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (2556 in 1:05-md-01717-LPS, 2153 in 1:05-cv-00485-LPS) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Eric P. Mandel filed by Phil Paul. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/15/13. Associated Cases: 1:05-cv-00485-LPS, 1:05-md-01717-LPS(ntl)
July 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 2557 ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties' joint proposed schedule for the July 16-18, 2013 hearing (D.I. 2552; D.I. 2149) is ADOPTED; each side will be allocated up to 7.5 hours for their presentation. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/15/13. Associated Cases: 1:05-cv-00485-LPS, 1:05-md-01717-LPS (ntl)
July 15, 2013 Filing 2556 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Eric P. Mandel - filed by Phil Paul. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Eric P. Mandel to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice)(Herbert, Laina)
July 15, 2013 Filing 2555 [SEALED] OBJECTIONS by Phil Paul Class Plaintiffs' Objections to Defendant Intel's Counter-Designations for the July 2013 Class Certification Hearing . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (UNDER SEAL), # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C (UNDER SEAL), # 4 Exhibit D (UNDER SEAL), # 5 Certificate of Service)(Herbert, Laina)
July 13, 2013 Filing 2554 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Class Plaintiffs' Deposition Designation Errata, Withdrawal of Objection, and Objections to Defendant Intel's Counter-Designations for the July 2013 Class Certification Hearing by Phil Paul.(Herbert, Laina)
July 12, 2013 Filing 2553 Joint PROPOSED ORDER Pre-Hearing Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Governing Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion For Class Certification and Defendant Intel Corporation's Motion to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Keith Leffler re (2143 in 1:05-cv-00485-LPS) Order, by Intel Corporation. (Horwitz, Richard)
July 12, 2013 Filing 2552 Joint Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Richard L. Horwitz regarding Parties submit joint letter regarding requested number of hours for the hearing scheduled July 16-18, 2013 - re (2143 in 1:05-cv-00485-LPS) Order,. (Horwitz, Richard)
July 12, 2013 Filing 2551 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Notice of Errata Regarding Intel Corporation's July 3, 2013 Deposition Designations and July 8, 2013 Exhibit List by Intel Corporation.(Horwitz, Richard)
July 12, 2013 Filing 2550 OBJECTIONS by Phil Paul Class Plaintiffs' Objections to Defendant Intel's List of Previously Unidentified Exhibits for the July 2013 Class Certification Hearing . (Herbert, Laina)
July 11, 2013 Filing 2549 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Intel Corporation's Objections and Counter-Designations to Plaintiff's Deposition Designation, with Certificate of Service by Intel Corporation.(Horwitz, Richard)
July 11, 2013 Filing 2548 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Intel Corporation's Additional Exhibits for the July 2013 Class Certification Hearing, with Certificate of Service by Intel Corporation.(Horwitz, Richard)
July 11, 2013 Filing 2547 NOTICE of SERVICE by Phil Paul of Class Plaintiffs' Objections and Counter-Designations to Defendant Intel's Deposition Designations for the July 2013 Class Certification Hearing (Herbert, Laina)
July 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 2546 ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall submit a joint letter by July 12, 2013 regarding the requested number of hours for the July 16-18, 2013 hearing. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/10/13. Associated Cases: 1:05-cv-00485-LPS, 1:05-md-01717-LPS(ntl)
July 9, 2013 Filing 2545 NOTICE of SERVICE by Phil Paul of Class Plaintiffs' List of Previously Unidentified Exhibits for the July 2013 Class Certification Hearing (Herbert, Laina)
July 5, 2013 Filing 2544 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Class Plaintiffs List of Deposition Designations for the July 2013 Class Certification Hearing by Phil Paul.(Athey, J.)
July 5, 2013 Filing 2543 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Intel Corporation's Additional Deposition Designations by Intel Corporation.(Horwitz, Richard)
April 30, 2013 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Howard M. Bushman for Maria I. Prohias added for electronic noticing. (dmp, )
April 22, 2013 Filing 2542 REDACTED VERSION of (2137 in 1:05-cv-00485-LPS) Declaration, (2540 in 1:05-md-01717-LPS) Declaration, Supplemental Declaration of Laina M. Herbert in Support of Plaintiffs' Pre-Hearing Reply Brief Regarding Class Certification by Phil Paul. (Herbert, Laina)
April 22, 2013 Filing 2541 REDACTED VERSION of (2136 in 1:05-cv-00485-LPS) Response to Order, (2539 in 1:05-md-01717-LPS) Response to Order Plaintiffs' Pre-Hearing Reply Brief Regarding Class Certification by Phil Paul. (Herbert, Laina)
April 15, 2013 Filing 2540 [SEALED] DECLARATION re # 2539 Response to Order Supplemental Declaration of Laina M. Herbert in Support of Plaintiffs' Pre-Hearing Reply Brief Regarding Class Certification by Phil Paul. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 27-30, # 2 Exhibit 31, Part 1, # 3 Exhibit 31, Part 2, # 4 Exhibit 32-38, # 5 Exhibit 39-43)(Athey, J.)
April 15, 2013 Filing 2539 [SEALED] RESPONSE to Order re # 2519 Order, Set Hearings, # 2517 Memorandum and Order, Plaintiffs' Pre-Hearing Reply Brief Regarding Class Certification filed by Phil Paul. (Athey, J.)
April 11, 2013 Filing 2538 NOTICE of Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant Intel Corporation's Notice of Supplemental Authority by Phil Paul re (2134 in 1:05-cv-00485-LPS, 2537 in 1:05-md-01717-LPS) Notice (Other),, (Athey, J.)
March 29, 2013 Filing 2537 NOTICE of Intel Corporation's Supplemental Authority by Intel Corporation re (2130 in 1:05-cv-00485-LPS) MOTION Defendant Intel Corporation's Supplemental Pre-Hearing Brief Regarding Plaintiffs' Objections to Special Master's Report and Recommendations Granting Intel's Motion to Exclude Dr. Keith Leffler and Denying Plaintiffs' M, (2533 in 1:05-md-01717-LPS) MOTION Defendant Intel Corporation's Supplemental Pre-Hearing Brief Regarding Plaintiffs' Objections to Special Master's Report and Recommendations Granting Intel's Motion to Exclude Dr. Keith Leffler and Denying Plaintiffs' M (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Horwitz, Richard)
March 25, 2013 Filing 2536 REDACTED VERSION of # 2534 Declaration, of Sujal J. Shah in Support of Defendant Intel Corporation's Supplemental Pre-Hearing Brief by Intel Corporation. (Horwitz, Richard)
March 25, 2013 Filing 2535 REDACTED VERSION of # 2533 MOTION Defendant Intel Corporation's Supplemental Pre-Hearing Brief Regarding Plaintiffs' Objections to Special Master's Report and Recommendations Granting Intel's Motion to Exclude Dr. Keith Leffler and Denying Plaintiffs' M otion to Certify Class by Intel Corporation. (Horwitz, Richard)
March 18, 2013 Filing 2534 [SEALED] DECLARATION re # 2533 MOTION Defendant Intel Corporation's Supplemental Pre-Hearing Brief Regarding Plaintiffs' Objections to Special Master's Report and Recommendations Granting Intel's Motion to Exclude Dr. Keith Leffler and Denying Plaintiffs' M by Intel Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-7, # 2 Exhibit 8, # 3 Exhibit 9-18, # 4 Exhibit 19-34)(Horwitz, Richard)
March 18, 2013 Filing 2533 [SEALED] MOTION Defendant Intel Corporation's Supplemental Pre-Hearing Brief Regarding Plaintiffs' Objections to Special Master's Report and Recommendations Granting Intel's Motion to Exclude Dr. Keith Leffler and Denying Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify Class - filed by Intel Corporation. (Horwitz, Richard)
March 12, 2013 Filing 2532 NOTICE of Service of Rebuttal Declaration of David P. Kaplan by Intel Corporation (Horwitz, Richard)
March 11, 2013 Filing 2531 NOTICE to Take Deposition of David P. Kaplan on April 2 and April 3, 2013 at 9:00 a.m. by Phil Paul.(Herbert, Laina)
March 7, 2013 Pro Hac Vice Attorney David E. Kovel,Karina Kosharskyy for Phil Paul added for electronic noticing. (dmp, )
February 27, 2013 Pro Hac Vice Attorney David A. Young,Daniel H. Silverman for Phil Paul added for electronic noticing. Associated Cases: 1:05-cv-00485-LPS, 1:05-md-01717-LPS(dmp, )
February 25, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (2530 in 1:05-md-01717-LPS, 2127 in 1:05-cv-00485-LPS) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Daniel Hume, David E. Kovel and Karina Kosharskyy filed by Phil Paul. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 2/25/13. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-LPS, 1:05-cv-00485-LPS(ntl)
February 21, 2013 Filing 2530 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Daniel Hume, David E. Kovel and Karina Kosharskyy - filed by Phil Paul. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Daniel Hume to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice, # 2 Certification of David E. Kovel to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice, # 3 Certification of Karina Kosharskyy to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice)(Herbert, Laina)
February 21, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (2529 in 1:05-md-01717-LPS, 2126 in 1:05-cv-00485-LPS) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David A. Young and Daniel H. Silverman filed by Phil Paul. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 2/21/13. Associated Cases: 1:05-cv-00485-LPS, 1:05-md-01717-LPS(ntl)
February 19, 2013 Filing 2529 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David A. Young and Daniel H. Silverman - filed by Phil Paul. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of David A. Young to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice, # 2 Certification of Daniel H. Silverman to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice)(Herbert, Laina)
February 1, 2013 Filing 2528 REDACTED VERSION of (2527 in 1:05-md-01717-LPS, 2124 in 1:05-cv-00485-LPS) Letter, Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Laina M. Herbert regarding Errata to the Report of Keith Leffler in Rebuttal to the Reply Declaration of David P. Kaplan, dated January 31, 2013 by Phil Paul. (Herbert, Laina)
January 31, 2013 Filing 2527 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Laina M. Herbert regarding Errata to the Report of Keith Leffler in Rebuttal to the Reply Declaration of David P. Kaplan, dated January 31, 2013 - re (2524 in 1:05-md-01717-LPS) Declaration, (2121 in 1:05-cv-00485-LPS) Declaration,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Errata to the Report of Keith Leffler in Rebuttal to the Reply Declaration of David P. Kaplan, dated January 31, 2013, # 2 Exhibit Certificate of Service)(Herbert, Laina)
January 29, 2013 Filing 2526 REDACTED VERSION of (2524 in 1:05-md-01717-LPS) Declaration, (2121 in 1:05-cv-00485-LPS) Declaration, Declaration of Laina M. Herbert in Support of Class Plaintiffs' Pre-Hearing Brief Regarding Class Certification by Phil Paul. (Herbert, Laina)
January 29, 2013 Filing 2525 REDACTED VERSION of (2523 in 1:05-md-01717-LPS) Response to Order, (2120 in 1:05-cv-00485-LPS) Response to Order, Class Plaintiffs' Pre-Hearing Brief Regarding Class Certification by Phil Paul. (Herbert, Laina)
January 22, 2013 Filing 2524 [SEALED] DECLARATION re # 2519 Order, Set Hearings, # 2517 Memorandum and Order, of Laina M. Herbert in Support of Class Plaintiffs Pre-Hearing Brief Regarding Class Certification by Phil Paul. (Athey, J.) NOTE: Original copy for Court Record presented only in PAPER format due to file size - on file with Clerk's Office. Modified on 1/23/2013 (rbe)
January 22, 2013 Filing 2523 [SEALED] SEALED RESPONSE to Order re # 2519 Order, Set Hearings, # 2517 Memorandum and Order, Class Plaintiffs Pre-Hearing Brief Regarding Class Certification filed by Phil Paul. (Athey, J.) (Main Document 2523 replaced on 1/23/2013) (rbe).
January 15, 2013 Filing 2522 NOTICE of Service of Report of Keith Leffler in Rebuttal to the Reply Declaration of David P. Kaplan dated January 14, 2013 and Backup Data by Phil Paul re (2397 in 1:05-md-01717-LPS, 1999 in 1:05-cv-00485-LPS) Letter, (2519 in 1:05-md-01717-LPS, 2519 in 1:05-md-01717-LPS, 2117 in 1:05-cv-00485-LPS, 2117 in 1:05-cv-00485-LPS) Order, Set Hearings, (2517 in 1:05-md-01717-LPS, 2115 in 1:05-cv-00485-LPS) Memorandum and Order, (Herbert, Laina)
October 22, 2012 Filing 2521 NOTICE of of Withdrawal of Appearance of Richard M. Volin by Phil Paul (Herbert, Laina)
October 22, 2012 Filing 2520 NOTICE of of Withdrawal of Appearance of Richard M. Volin by Phil Paul (Herbert, Laina)
October 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 2519 ORDER Regarding Schedule for Further Proceedings: A three-day Evidentiary Hearing is set for 7/16-18/2013 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 6B. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/16/12. Associated Cases: 1:05-cv-00485-LPS, 1:05-md-01717-LPS(ntl)
October 15, 2012 Filing 2518 PROPOSED ORDER Joint Status Report and [Proposed] Order Regarding Schedule for Further Proceedings Consistent with Court's September 28, 2012 Memorandum Opinion re (2517 in 1:05-md-01717-LPS, 2115 in 1:05-cv-00485-LPS) Memorandum and Order, by Phil Paul. (Herbert, Laina)
September 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 2517 MEMORANDUM ORDER: the parties shall meet and confer and file a joint status report no later than 10/15/12; the following motions are terminated: Amended Motion to Modify Protective Order and Approve Protocol for Unsealing Documents # 1520 ; Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions # 2291 ; and Intel's Motion to Strike Declaration of Shaun M. Simmons # 2354 . Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/28/12. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-LPS, 1:05-cv-00485-LPS(ntl)
July 17, 2012 Filing 2516 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from J. Clayton Athey regarding regarding recent decision of In Re K-Dur Antitrust Litig. - re (2078 in 1:05-cv-00485-LPS, 2476 in 1:05-md-01717-LPS) Objections,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit In Re K-Dur Antitrust Litig.)(Athey, J.)
January 18, 2012 Filing 2515 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Laina M. Herbert regarding recent decision of Messner v. Northshore Univ. HealthSystem - re (2078 in 1:05-cv-00485-LPS, 2476 in 1:05-md-01717-LPS) Objections,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Herbert, Laina)
December 28, 2011 Filing 2514 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Laina M. Herbert regarding recent decision of Sullivan v. DB Invs., Inc. - re (2078 in 1:05-cv-00485-LPS, 2476 in 1:05-md-01717-LPS) Objections,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Part 1 of 2 - Sullivan v. DB Invs., Inc., # 2 Exhibit Part 2 of 2 - Sullivan v. DB Invs., Inc.)(Herbert, Laina)
September 14, 2011 Filing 2513 NOTICE of WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL (W. HARDING DRANE, JR.) by Intel Corporation (Drane, W.)
August 25, 2011 Filing 2512 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Richard L. Horwitz regarding Intel's Response to Plaintiff's Letter Submitting Third Circuit's Recent Decision in Behrend v. Comcast Corp. - re (2109 in 1:05-cv-00485-LPS, 2511 in 1:05-md-01717-LPS) Letter,. (Horwitz, Richard)
August 24, 2011 Filing 2511 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Laina M. Herbert regarding recent decision of Behrend v. Comcast Corp. - re (2078 in 1:05-cv-00485-LPS, 2476 in 1:05-md-01717-LPS) Objections,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Behrend v. Comcast Corp.)(Herbert, Laina)
August 18, 2011 Filing 2510 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance of Matthew Shaftel by Phil Paul (Herbert, Laina)
August 17, 2011 Filing 2509 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Thomas G. Macauley as co-counsel. Reason for request: participation concluded. (Macauley, Thomas)
August 17, 2011 CORRECTING ENTRY: Motion to Withdraw as Attorney filed 8/17/11 by Thomas Macauley on behalf of Avnet and Ingram removed - to be refiled as a Notice. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-LPS, 1:05-cv-00485-LPS(rbe)
August 8, 2011 Filing 2508 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Eben F. Duval as co-counsel. Reason for request: no longer associated with Johnson & Perkinson as attorney for Ficor Acquisition Co, LLC. (Herbert, Laina)
July 8, 2011 Filing 2507 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from J. Clayton Athey regarding Response to Intel's submission regarding the recent Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. v. Dukes Opinion - re (2505 in 1:05-md-01717-LPS, 2103 in 1:05-cv-00485-LPS) Letter. (Athey, J.)
June 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 2506 ORAL ORDER: Having received Intel's letter of June 29, 2011 relating to Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. v. Dukes, Plaintiffs are directed to file a responsive letter no later than July 8, 2011. No further submissions will be permitted without leave of the Court. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 6/30/11. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-LPS, 1:05-cv-00485-LPS(ntl)
June 29, 2011 Filing 2505 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark with Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. v. Dukes Opinion attached from W. Harding Drane, Jr. regarding Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. v. Dukes Opinion. (Drane, W.)
March 23, 2011 Filing 2504 Official Transcript of Oral Argument Hearing held on March 2, 2011 before Judge Stark. Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan, Telephone number (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/13/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/25/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/21/2011. (bpg)
March 2, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark - Oral Argument held on 3/2/2011. (Court Reporter B. Gaffigan.) Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-LPS, 1:05-cv-00485-LPS(ntl)
March 1, 2011 Filing 2503 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from J. Clayton Athey regarding tomorrow's hearing and attaching a copy of a recent decision In re Neurontin Antitrust Litigation. (Attachments: # 1 Enclosure for Letter to the Honorable Leonard P. Stark)(Athey, J.)
February 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 2502 STIPULATION AND ORDER Further Modifying Case Management Order No. 4. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 2/23/11. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-LPS, 1:05-cv-00485-LPS(ntl)
February 22, 2011 Filing 2501 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Seth R. Gassman as co-counsel. Reason for request: no longer associated with the firm of Cohen, Milstein. (Herbert, Laina)
February 18, 2011 Filing 2500 NOTICE of Change of Address by Jeffrey F. Keller (Keller, Jeffrey)
February 7, 2011 Filing 2499 {SEALED} Letter to Counsel from Special Master Poppiti. (ntl)
December 27, 2010 Filing 2498 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Laina M. Herbert regarding Enclosing two disks (one DVD containing courtesy copy of Class Plaintiffs' Rule 53(f) Objections to the Special Master's Report and Recommendations Granting Intel's Motion to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Keith Leffler and Denying Class Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify Class filed October 4, 2010; and one CD containing Class Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of their Objections filed December 10, 2010 - re (2078 in 1:05-cv-00485-LPS, 2476 in 1:05-md-01717-LPS) Objections, (2097 in 1:05-cv-00485-LPS) Reply Brief,. (Herbert, Laina)
December 21, 2010 Filing 2497 REDACTED VERSION of (2097 in 1:05-cv-00485-LPS) Reply Brief, (2496 in 1:05-md-01717-LPS) Reply Brief, Class Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Their Objections to The Special Master's Report and Recommendations Denying Class Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, Granting Intel's Motion to Exclude Dr. Keith Leffler, and Excluding Dr. Leffler's Rebuttal Analysis by Phil Paul. (Holzman, James)
December 10, 2010 Filing 2496 SEALED REPLY BRIEF CLASS PLAINTIFFS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THEIR OBJECTIONS TO THE SPECIAL MASTER'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS DENYING CLASS PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION, GRANTING INTEL'S MOTION TO EXCLUDE DR. KEITH LEFFLER, AND EXCLUDING DR. LEFFLER'S REBUTTAL ANALYSIS filed by Phil Paul. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Reply, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Reply)(Holzman, James)
November 23, 2010 Filing 2495 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from W. Harding Drane, Jr. regarding enclosure of CD-Rom containing a courtesy copy of Intel's Response to Plaintiffs' Objections to Special Master's Report and Recommendations - re (2490 in 1:05-md-01717-LPS, 2091 in 1:05-cv-00485-LPS) Respone to Objections,. (Drane, W.)
November 22, 2010 Filing 2494 REDACTED VERSION of (2491 in 1:05-md-01717-LPS, 2092 in 1:05-cv-00485-LPS) Declaration, OF MIT WINTER IN SUPPORT OF INTEL CORPORATION'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' OBJECTIONS TO SPECIAL MASTER'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS GRANTING INTEL'S MOTION TO EXCLUDE DR. KEITH LEFFLER AND DENYING CLASS PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO CERTIFY CLASS AND ORDER EXCLUDING NEW ANALYSES by Intel Corporation. (Drane, W.)
November 22, 2010 Filing 2493 REDACTED VERSION of (2490 in 1:05-md-01717-LPS, 2091 in 1:05-cv-00485-LPS) Respone to Objections, DEFENDANT INTEL CORPORATION'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' OBJECTIONS TO SPECIAL MASTER'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS GRANTING INTEL'S MOTION TO EXCLUDE DR. KEITH LEFFLER AND DENYING CLASS PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO CERTIFY CLASS AND ORDER EXCLUDING NEW ANALYSES by Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha. (Attachments: # 1 Part 2 of Response)(Drane, W.)
November 15, 2010 Filing 2492 APPENDIX re (2490 in 1:05-md-01717-LPS, 2091 in 1:05-cv-00485-LPS) Respone to Objections, APPENDIX OF UNPUBLISHED AND NON-FEDERAL AUTHORITIES FOR DEFENDANT INTEL CORPORATION'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' OBJECTIONS TO SPECIAL MASTER'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS WITH TABS 1-20 by Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19)(Drane, W.)
November 15, 2010 Filing 2491 SEALED DECLARATION re (2490 in 1:05-md-01717-LPS, 2091 in 1:05-cv-00485-LPS) Respone to Objections, DECLARATION OF MIT WINTER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT INTEL CORPORATION'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' OBJECTIONS TO SPECIAL MASTER'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS GRANTING INTEL'S MOTION TO EXCLUDE DR. KEITH LEFFLER AND DENYING CLASS PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO CERTIFY CLASS AND ORDER EXCLUDING NEW ANALYSES WITH EXHIBITS 1-20 by Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha. (Drane, W.)
November 15, 2010 Filing 2490 RESPONSE TO OBJECTIONS by Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha re (2078 in 1:05-cv-00485-LPS, 2476 in 1:05-md-01717-LPS) Objections, SEALED - DEFENDANT INTEL CORPORATION'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' OBJECTIONS TO SPECIAL MASTER'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS GRANTING INTEL'S MOTION TO EXCLUDE DR. KEITH LEFFLER AND DENYING CLASS PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO CERTIFY CLASS AND ORDER EXCLUDING NEW ANALYSES . (Drane, W.)
November 8, 2010 Filing 2489 Official Transcript of Telephone Conference held on October 19, 2010 before Judge Stark. Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/29/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/9/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/7/2011. (bpg)
October 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2488 ORAL ORDER: the Oral Argument set for 2/22/2011 at 2:00 PM is CANCELLED and is hereby rescheduled for 3/2/2011 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6B before Judge Leonard P. Stark re Objections to Special Master's Report and Recommendation. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/22/10.Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-LPS, 1:05-cv-00485-LPS(ntl)
October 19, 2010 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark - Telephone Conference held on 10/19/2010. (Court Reporter B. Gaffigan.) Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-LPS, 1:05-cv-00485-LPS(ntl)
October 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2487 ORAL ORDER: Oral Argument set for 2/22/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6B before Judge Leonard P. Stark re Objections to Special Master's Report and Recommendation. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/19/10. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-LPS, 1:05-cv-00485-LPS(ntl)
October 15, 2010 Filing 2486 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from J. Clayton Athey regarding Intel's October 13, 2010 letter - re (2085 in 1:05-cv-00485-LPS, 2483 in 1:05-md-01717-LPS) Letter. (Athey, J.)
October 15, 2010 Filing 2485 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Richard L. Horwitz regarding Response to Plaintiff's October 13, 2010 letter - re (2084 in 1:05-cv-00485-LPS, 2482 in 1:05-md-01717-LPS) Letter,. (Horwitz, Richard)
October 15, 2010 Filing 2484 REDACTED VERSION of (2078 in 1:05-cv-00485-LPS, 2476 in 1:05-md-01717-LPS) Objections, Rule 53(f) Objections to Special Master's Report and Recommendations Granting Intel's Motion to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Keith Leffler and Denying Class Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify Class by Phil Paul. (Herbert, Laina)
October 13, 2010 Filing 2483 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Richard L. Horwitz regarding Response to the Court's October 8, 2010 Order. (Horwitz, Richard)
October 13, 2010 Filing 2482 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from J. Clayton Athey regarding Page length of Class Plaintiffs' Rule 53(f) Objections to Special Master's Report and Recommendations Granting Intel's Motion to Exclude Testimony - re (2083 in 1:05-cv-00485-LPS, 2083 in 1:05-cv-00485-LPS) Order, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Athey, J.)
October 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2481 ORAL ORDER: The Court, having reviewed the parties letters of October 5, 2010 relating to Plaintiffs 74-page objections to the special masters 111-page Report and Recommendations, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the parties shall file simultaneous letters according to the schedule set forth below, addressing whether Plaintiffs objections should be stricken and resubmitted in a shorter version, what page limits should be set for Defendants answer and Plaintiffs reply, and whether the agreed-upon schedule for briefing the objections requires modification. The parties shall file three-page opening letters on October 13, 2010 and two-page responsive letters on October 15, 2010. The Court will hold a teleconference to discuss this issue on October 19, 2010 at 1 p.m. Plaintiffs counsel shall initiate the call to (302) 573-4573 (Telephone Conference set for 10/19/2010 01:00 PM before Judge Leonard P. Stark). ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/8/10. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-LPS, 1:05-cv-00485-LPS(ntl)
October 5, 2010 Filing 2480 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from J. Clayton Athey regarding Intel's Letter of October 5 Re Page Length - re (2479 in 1:05-md-01717-LPS) Letter, (2081 in 1:05-cv-00485-LPS) Letter. (Athey, J.)
October 5, 2010 Filing 2479 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Richard L. Horwitz regarding Intel's Objection to Plaintiff''s Brief - re # 2476 Objections,. (Horwitz, Richard)
October 4, 2010 Filing 2478 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from J. Clayton Athey regarding Enclosing courtesy copies of Class Plaintiffs' Rule 53(f) Objections to Special Master's Report and Recommendations Granting Intel's Motion to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Keith Leffler and Denying Class Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify Class - re (2477 in 1:05-md-01717-LPS, 2079 in 1:05-cv-00485-LPS) Declaration, (2078 in 1:05-cv-00485-LPS, 2476 in 1:05-md-01717-LPS) Objections,. (Athey, J.)
October 4, 2010 Filing 2477 SEALED DECLARATION re (2078 in 1:05-cv-00485-LPS, 2476 in 1:05-md-01717-LPS) Objections, Declaration of J. Clayton Athey in Support of Class Plaintiffs' Rule 53(f) Objections to Special Master's Report and Recommendations Granting Intel's Motion to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Keith Leffler and Denying Class Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify Class by Phil Paul. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-7 Filed Under Seal)(Athey, J.)
October 4, 2010 Filing 2476 OBJECTIONS by Phil Paul to (2073 in 1:05-cv-00485-LPS, 2471 in 1:05-md-01717-LPS) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master Rule 53(f) Objections to Special Master's Report and Recommendations Granting Intel's Motion to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Keith Leffler and Denying Class Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify Class - FILED UNDER SEAL . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Athey, J.)
September 10, 2010 Filing 2475 MDL ORDER Reassigning Litigation to Judge Stark. Signed by Chairman John G. Heyburn II on 9/10/10. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-LPS et al.(ntl)
August 20, 2010 Case reassigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (ntl)
August 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2474 ORDER Granting (2473 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF, and 2075 in 1:05-cv-00485-LPS) PROPOSED Stipulation and Order Regarding Disposition Of Certain Motions And Briefing Schedule On Class Plaintiffs' Forthcoming Objections To The Special Master's July 28, 2010 Report and Recommendation. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/17/2010. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-LPS(nms)
August 9, 2010 Filing 2473 PROPOSED Stipulation and Order Regarding Disposition Of Certain Motions And Briefing Schedule On Class Plaintiffs' Forthcoming Objections To The Special Master's July 28, 2010 Report and Recommendation, signed by Special Master Vincent J. Poppiti. (nms)
July 28, 2010 Filing 2472 Letter to James L. Holzman, Esq. and Richard L. Horwitz, Esq., dated 7/28/2010, from Special Master Vincent J. Poppiti, advising of the scheduling for pending motions. (nms)
July 28, 2010 CORRECTING ENTRY: The docket text for D.I. 2471 in 05-md-1717-JJF and D.I. 2073 in 05-cv-485-JJF (Report and Recommendation) has been amended to reflect that the filing was signed by Special Master Vincent J. Poppiti. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
July 28, 2010 Filing 2471 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master Granting Intel's Motion To Exclude Testimony of Dr. Keith Leffler And Denying Class Plaintiffs' Motion To Certify Class. Objections to R&R due by 8/23/2010. Signed by Special Master Vincent J. Poppiti on 7/28/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A, # 2 Appendix B, # 3 Appendix C, # 4 Appendix D (Part 1 of 2), # 5 Appendix D (Part 2 of 2))Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms) Modified on 7/28/2010 (nms).
July 22, 2010 CORRECTING ENTRY: The PDFs for D.I. 2072 in 05-cv-485-JJF, and D.I. 2470 in 05-md-1717-JJF, have been replaced with amended versions. The new versions add a case caption to the documents. (nms)
July 21, 2010 Filing 2470 EXHIBIT re (2469 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 2071 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF) Letter Exhibit A to Letter to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti from J. Clayton Athey dated July 21, 2010 by Phil Paul. (Athey, J.) (nms).
July 21, 2010 Filing 2469 Letter to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti from J. Clayton Athey regarding Alert Court to recent decision and to respond to Intel's letter of July 16, 2010 - re (2070 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF, 2468 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF) Letter. (Athey, J.)
July 16, 2010 Filing 2468 Letter to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti from W. Harding Drane, Jr. regarding Third Circuit Decision, No. 08-2784 (filed July 13, 2010). (Drane, W.) Modified on 7/19/2010 (nms).
July 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2467 ORDER ADOPTING (2382 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1984 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF) Report and Recommendations of the Special Master (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 7/13/2010. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
June 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2466 ORDER Granting Stipulation and Order Regarding Time To Respond To # 2459 Special Master's Report and Recommendations Regarding Intel Corporation's Motion To Preclude Dr. Keith Leffler's New Analyses (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 6/29/2010. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms) Modified on 7/12/2010 (nms).
June 21, 2010 Filing 2465 Letter to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti from W. Harding Drane, Jr. regarding in response to Plaintiffs' letter of June 16, 2010, regarding supplemental authority for the class certification motion. - re (2065 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF, 2463 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF) Letter,. (Drane, W.)
June 17, 2010 Filing 2464 REDACTED VERSION of (2065 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF, 2463 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF) Letter to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti from J. Clayton Athey dated June 16, 2010 with Exhibits A & B, Part 1 & 2, by Phil Paul. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A & B, Part 2 of 2)(Herbert, Laina) Modified on 6/18/2010 (nms).
June 16, 2010 Filing 2463 SEALED Letter to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti from J. Clayton Athey regarding response to W. Harding Drane's June 11, 2010 letter and further support for Class Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification - re (2462 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 2064 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF) Letter,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A & B)(Athey, J.)
June 11, 2010 Filing 2462 Letter to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti with Exhibit A from W. Harding Drane, Jr. regarding enclosing subsequent authority in support of Intel's Opposition to Class Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification (D.I. 1245) - re (1245 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF) Answering Brief in Opposition. (Drane, W.)
June 7, 2010 Filing 2461 REDACTED VERSION of # 2458 Letter to the Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti, by Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha. (Drane, W.) Modified on 6/8/2010 (nms).
June 4, 2010 Filing 2460 REDACTED VERSION of (2455 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 2057 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF) Letter to the Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti from J. Clayton Athey regarding Opposition to Intel's May 19, 2010 Motion to Strike, by Phil Paul. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-C)(Herbert, Laina) Modified on 6/7/2010 (nms).
June 4, 2010 REDACTION NOTICE: In accordance with section G of the Administrative Procedures Governing Filing and Service by Electronic Means, redacted versions of sealed documents shall be filed electronically within 7 days of the filing of the sealed document. The records of this case do not reflect the filing of a redacted version of DI # 2455 . (nms)
June 2, 2010 Filing 2459 SEALED REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master regarding Intel Corporation's Motion To Preclude Dr. Keith Leffler's New Analyses Objections to R&R due by 6/28/2010. Signed by Special Master Vincent J. Poppiti on 6/2/2010. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
June 1, 2010 Filing 2458 SEALED Letter to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti from W. Harding Drane, Jr. regarding Reply Brief - re (2455 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 2057 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF) Letter,. (Drane, W.)
May 27, 2010 Filing 2457 SEALED Transcript of Teleconference held on 4/9/2010 before Special Master Vincent J. Poppiti. (Transcript on file in Clerk's Office) Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
May 26, 2010 Filing 2456 Letter to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti with Exhibits A-C from W. Harding Drane, Jr. regarding Redacted Hearing Transcripts (4/15, 4/16 and 4/19/10). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, Part 1, # 2 Exhibit A, Part 2, # 3 Exhibit A, Part 3, # 4 Exhibit B, Part 1, # 5 Exhibit B, Part 2, # 6 Exhibit B, Part 3, # 7 Exhibit C, Part 1, # 8 Exhibit C, Part 2)(Drane, W.)
May 26, 2010 Filing 2455 SEALED Letter to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti from J. Clayton Athey regarding Opposition to Intel's May 19, 2010 Motion to Strike - re (2053 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF, 2451 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF) Letter. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-C)(Athey, J.)
May 25, 2010 Filing 2454 REDACTED VERSION of # 2451 Letter to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti, by Intel Corporation. (Drane, W.) Modified on 5/26/2010 (nms).
May 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2453 ORDER Granting Intel's Request For An Extension Of Time To File Hearing Redactions. Signed by Special Master Vincent J. Poppiti on 5/21/2010. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
May 20, 2010 Filing 2452 REDACTED VERSION of (2043 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF, and 2441 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF) Letter to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti from J. Clayton Athey reqarding Intel's May 5, 2010 letter requesting a status conference, by Phil Paul. (Herbert, Laina) Modified on 5/21/2010 (nms).
May 19, 2010 Filing 2451 SEALED Letter to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti from W. Harding Drane, Jr. regarding Motion to Strike with Exhibits A&B. (Drane, W.)
May 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2450 SO ORDERED Granting Stipulation and Order Regarding Briefing Schedule On Intel's Motion To Strike. Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 5/18/2010. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
May 17, 2010 Filing 2449 REDACTED VERSION of (2030 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF, and 2428 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF) Class Plaintiffs' Opposition to Intel's Motion to Strike the Declaration of Shaun M. Simmons, by Phil Paul. (Athey, J.) Modified on 5/18/2010 (nms).
May 17, 2010 Filing 2448 REDACTED VERSION of (2429 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 2031 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF) Rebuttal Declaration of Barry J. Murphy, by Phil Paul. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits)(Athey, J.) Modified on 5/18/2010 (nms).
May 17, 2010 Filing 2447 REDACTED VERSION of (2430 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 2032 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF) Rebuttal Declaration of Dr. James R. Thompson in Opposition to Intel's Motion to Strike Simmons Declaration, by Phil Paul. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits)(Athey, J.) Modified on 5/18/2010 (nms).
May 17, 2010 Filing 2446 REDACTED VERSION of (2036 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF, 2434 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF) Exhibits 1-56 to Rebuttal Declaration of George J. Socha, Jr., by Phil Paul. (Athey, J.) Modified on 5/18/2010 (nms).
May 17, 2010 Filing 2445 REDACTED VERSION of (2431 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 2033 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF) Rebuttal Declaration of George J. Socha, Jr., by Phil Paul. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A and B)(Athey, J.) Modified on 5/18/2010 (nms).
May 17, 2010 Filing 2444 REDACTED VERSION of (2432 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 2034 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF) Declaration of Demetrius X. Lambrinos, by Phil Paul. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits)(Athey, J.) Modified on 5/18/2010 (nms).
May 17, 2010 Filing 2443 REDACTED VERSION of (2433 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF) Reply Brief, (2035 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF) Reply Brief Class Plaintiffs' Reply in Further Support of their Motion for Sanctions for Intel's Failure to Preserve Evidence by Phil Paul. (Athey, J.)
May 14, 2010 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (2017 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF, 2415 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Qianwei Fu filed by Phil Paul. Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 5/14/2010. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
May 10, 2010 Filing 2442 REDACTED VERSION of (2039 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF, 2437 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF) Letter to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti by Intel Corporation. (Drane, W.)
May 7, 2010 Filing 2441 SEALED Letter to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti from J. Clayton Athey regarding Intel's May 5, 2010 letter requesting a status conference with Exhibit 1 and Exhibits A-D - re (2039 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF, 2437 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF) Letter. (Herbert, Laina)
May 5, 2010 Filing 2440 SEALED Transcript of Sealed Hearing held on 4/19/2010 before Judge Special Master Vincent Poppiti. (Transcript on file in Clerk's Office) Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
May 5, 2010 Filing 2439 SEALED Transcript of Sealed Hearing held on 4/16/2010 before Judge Special Master Poppiti. (Transcript on file in Clerk's Office) Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms) Modified on 5/6/2010 (nms).
May 5, 2010 Filing 2438 SEALED Transcript of Sealed Hearing held on 4/15/2010 before Judge Special Master Vincent Poppiti. (Transcript on file in Clerk's Office) Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms) Modified on 5/6/2010 (nms).
May 5, 2010 Filing 2437 SEALED Letter to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti from W. Harding Drane, Jr. regarding request for status conference with Exhibit A. (Drane, W.)
May 4, 2010 Filing 2436 REDACTED VERSION of (2003 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF, 2401 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF) Objections and Counter-Designations to Class Plaintiffs' List of Deposition Designations For the Class Certification Hearing, by Intel Corporation. (Drane, W.) Modified on 5/5/2010 (nms).
May 4, 2010 Filing 2435 REDACTED VERSION of (1928 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF, 2322 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF) Declaration, Sujal J. Shah In Support of Defendant Intel Corporation's Response to Plaintiffs' Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by Intel Corporation. (Drane, W.)
May 4, 2010 Filing 2434 SEALED EXHIBIT re (2431 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 2033 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF) Declaration Exhibits 1-56 to the Rebuttal Declaraton of George J. Socha, Jr. by Phil Paul. (Athey, J.)
May 4, 2010 CORRECTING ENTRY: Exhibits 1-56 attached to D.I. 2033 in 05-cv-485-JJF, and D.I. 2431 in 05-md-1717-JJF have been removed from the filings as counsel filed them in separated envelopes from the main document. Counsel will re-file these exhibits and link them back to the declaration they are in support of. (nms)
May 3, 2010 Filing 2433 SEALED REPLY BRIEF re # 2291 MOTION for Sanctions Class Plaintiffs' Reply in Further Support of their Motion for Sanctions for Intel's Failure to Preserve Evidence filed by Phil Paul. (Athey, J.)
May 3, 2010 Filing 2432 SEALED DECLARATION of Demetrius X. Lambrinos, by Phil Paul. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-46)(Athey, J.) Modified on 5/4/2010 (nms).
May 3, 2010 Filing 2431 SEALED Rebuttal DECLARATION of George J. Socha, Jr., by Phil Paul. (Attachments: # 1 Exhbiit A and B)(Athey, J.) Modified on 5/4/2010 (nms). Modified on 5/4/2010 (nms).
May 3, 2010 Filing 2430 SEALED Rebuttal DECLARATION of Dr. James R. Thompson in Opposition to Intel's Motion to Strike Simmons Declaration, by Phil Paul. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Athey, J.) Modified on 5/4/2010 (nms).
May 3, 2010 Filing 2429 SEALED Rebuttal DECLARATION of Barry J. Murphy, by Phil Paul. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-2)(Athey, J.) Modified on 5/4/2010 (nms).
May 3, 2010 Filing 2428 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re # 2354 MOTION to Strike The Declaration of Shaun M. Simmons (DM 44) Class Plaintiffs' Opposition to Intel's Motion to Strike the Declaration of Shaun M. Simmons filed by Phil Paul. (Athey, J.)
April 30, 2010 Filing 2427 Letter to Counsel, dated 4/30/2010, from Special Master Vincent J. Poppiti, regarding outstanding pending motion status. (nms)
April 27, 2010 Filing 2426 REDACTED VERSION of (2416 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 2018 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF) Letter to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti with Exhibit A by Intel Corporation. (Drane, W.)
April 26, 2010 Filing 2425 Letter to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti from W. Harding Drane, Jr. regarding Confidential Power Point/Demonstrative Exhibits (without enclosures). (Drane, W.)
April 26, 2010 Filing 2424 Letter to Jennifer Ford from Laina M. Herbert regarding Class Plaintiffs request that the Court include in the hearing record demonstrative exhibits and PowerPoint presentations used by Class Plaintiffs at the Class Certification hearing held April 15, 16, and 19, 2010. (Herbert, Laina)
April 23, 2010 Filing 2423 USCA Order Terminating Appeal as to # 1164 Notice of Appeal by Jonathan Lee Riches. USCA Decision: dismissed for failure to prosecute pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 3(a) and 3rd Cir. LAR 3.3 and Misc. 107.1(a). (pd, )
April 22, 2010 Filing 2422 SEALED Transcript of Teleconference held on 4/14/2010 before Judge Special Master Vincent J. Poppiti. (Transcript on file in Clerk's Office). (nms)
April 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2421 ORDER Granting the Request for Permission For Counsel to Possess and Utilize Laptop Computers During Court Proceedings in Courtroom 2A. Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 4/21/2010. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
April 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2420 ORDER Granting The Request For Permission For Counsel To Possess And Utilize Laptop Computers During Court Proceedings in Courtroom 2A. Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 4/21/2010. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
April 19, 2010 Filing 2419 SEALED Common Exhibit List for the hearing held on 4/15/2010, 4/16/2010, and 4/19/2010. (nms)
April 19, 2010 Filing 2418 SEALED Hearing Exhibit List by Class Plaintiffs' for the hearing held 4/15/2010, 4/16/2010, and 4/19/2010. (nms)
April 19, 2010 Filing 2417 SEALED Hearing Exhibit List for Defendant Intel Corporation for the proceeding held on 4/15/2010, 4/16/2010, and 4/19/2010. (nms)
April 14, 2010 Filing 2416 SEALED Letter to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti from W. Harding Drane, Jr. regarding Intel's objections to several exhibits Plaintiffs propose to introduce during Professor Leffler's testimony. (Drane, W.)
April 14, 2010 Filing 2415 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Qianwei Fu - filed by Phil Paul. (Attachments: # 1 Certification by Counsel to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice)(Herbert, Laina)
April 14, 2010 Filing 2414 SO ORDERED re Stipulation and Order Regarding Objections to Designated and Counter-Designated Deposition Testimony and Previously Unidentified Exhibits (see Order for further details). Signed by Special Master Vincent J. Poppiti on 4/14/2010. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
April 14, 2010 Filing 2413 REDACTED VERSION of (2402 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 2004 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF) Deposition Counter-Designations by Phil Paul. (Herbert, Laina)
April 13, 2010 Filing 2412 Letter to Counsel, dated 4/13/2010, from Special Master Vincent J. Poppiti, responding to Mr. Drane's letter dated 4/13/2010. (nms)
April 13, 2010 Filing 2410 Letter to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti from W. Harding Drane, Jr. regarding a request to modify Pre-Hearing ORder related to Plaintiffs' class certification motion. (Drane, W.)
April 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2411 ORDER Granting Permission for Counsel to Possess and Utilize Laptop Computers During Court Proceedings in Courtroom 2A (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 4/12/2010. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
April 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2409 ORDER Granting the request for the use of laptop computers during the proceedings scheduled to commence on 4/15/2010 (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 4/12/2010. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
April 12, 2010 Filing 2408 Letter to Counsel, dated 4/12/2010, from Special Master Vincent J. Poppiti, regarding # 2391 Intel's Letter/Motion to Preclude Dr. Leffler. (nms)
April 12, 2010 Filing 2407 PROPOSED ORDER Permission for Counsel to Possess and Utilize Laptop Computers During Court Proceedings in Courtroom 2A by Class Plaintiffs by Phil Paul. (Herbert, Laina)
April 12, 2010 Filing 2406 REDACTED VERSION of (2001 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF, 2399 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF) Letter, to the Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti, dated April 8, 2010, with Exhibit A attached by Intel Corporation. (Drane, W.)
April 12, 2010 Filing 2405 REDACTED VERSION of (2391 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1993 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF) Letter to the Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti with Exhibits A-C by Intel Corporation. (Drane, W.)
April 12, 2010 Filing 2404 PROPOSED ORDER Permission for Counsel (David C. Beach) to Possess and Utilize Laptop Computer During Court Proceedings in Courtroom 2A by Intel Corporation. (Drane, W.)
April 12, 2010 Filing 2403 NOTICE of Change of Address by Laina M. Herbert (Herbert, Laina)
April 9, 2010 Filing 2402 SEALED DEPOSITION COUNTER-DESIGNATIONS by Phil Paul.(Herbert, Laina) Modified on 4/12/2010 (nms).
April 9, 2010 Filing 2401 SEALED DEPOSITION COUNTER-DESIGNATIONS by Intel Corporation.(Drane, W.) Modified on 4/12/2010 (nms).
April 9, 2010 REDACTION NOTICE: In accordance with section G of the Administrative Procedures Governing Filing and Service by Electronic Means, redacted versions of sealed documents shall be filed electronically within 7 days of the filing of the sealed document. The records of this case do not reflect the filing of a redacted version of DI # 2322 . (nms)
April 9, 2010 Filing 2400 REDACTED VERSION of (2397 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1999 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF) Letter, to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti from James L. Holzman with attached Exhibits 1-3, dated April 6, 2010 by Phil Paul. (Holzman, James)
April 8, 2010 Filing 2399 SEALED Letter to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti from W. Harding Drane, Jr. regarding Intel's Reply in Further Support of its Request For an Order to Preclude Introduction of New Expert Analyses or Opinions - re (2397 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1999 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF) Letter, (2391 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1993 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF) Letter. (Drane, W.)
April 8, 2010 Filing 2398 Letter to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti from W. Harding Drane, Jr. regarding Response to Plaintiffs' Letter Re Their Interpretation of the Decision of the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California in In Re TFT-LCD Antitrust Litigation. (Drane, W.)
April 8, 2010 REDACTION NOTICE: In accordance with section G of the Administrative Procedures Governing Filing and Service by Electronic Means, redacted versions of sealed documents shall be filed electronically within 7 days of the filing of the sealed document. The records of this case do not reflect the filing of a redacted version of DI # 2391 . (nms)
April 6, 2010 Filing 2397 SEALED Letter to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti from James L. Holzman regarding responding to Intel's motion to preclude analyses - re (2391 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1993 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF) Letter. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-3)(Holzman, James)
April 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2396 ORDER Granting Stipulation and Proposed Order Regarding Briefing Schedule on Intel's Motion to Preclude Introduction of Certain Analysis of Dr. Keith Leffler. Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 4/6/2010. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
April 6, 2010 Filing 2395 REDACTED VERSION of (2393 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1995 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF) Class Plaintiffs' List of Deposition Designations for the Class Certification Hearing, by Phil Paul. (Herbert, Laina) Modified on 4/7/2010 (nms).
April 5, 2010 CORRECTING ENTRY: The hard copy filings of D.I. 1878 in 05-cv-485-JJF, and D.I. 2271 in 05-md-1717-JJF have been replaced with amended versions per counsel's request. The new version corrects errors found in the exhibits. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
April 2, 2010 Filing 2394 DESIGNATIONS of Additional Deposition Testimony, by Intel Corporation.(Drane, W.) Modified on 4/5/2010 (nms).
April 2, 2010 Filing 2393 SEALED NOTICE of Class Plaintiffs' List of Deposition Designations for the Class Certification Hearing by Phil Paul (Athey, J.)
March 31, 2010 Filing 2392 Letter to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti from James L. Holzman regarding In re: TFT-LCD (Flat Panel) Antitrust Litig.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, TFT-LCD (Flat Panel) Antitrust Litig.)(Holzman, James)
March 30, 2010 Filing 2391 SEALED Letter to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti from W. Harding Drane, Jr. with Exhibits A-C regarding seeking order to preclude introduction of new expert analyses or opinions. (Drane, W.)
March 30, 2010 Filing 2390 NOTICE of Deposition and Document Request for John Jessen on April 7, 2010 at 9:00 a.m. by Phil Paul (Attachments: # 1 Schedule A)(Herbert, Laina)
March 29, 2010 Filing 2387 REDACTED VERSION of (1977 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF, 2374 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF) Statement of Errata by Intel Corporation. (Drane, W.)
March 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2389 ORDER Granting Stipulation and (Proposed) Order Regarding Revised Briefing Schedule on Class Plaintiffs' Sanction Motion (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 3/26/2010. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
March 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2388 ORDER Granting Pre-Hearing Proposed Order Governing Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification and Defendant Intel Corporation's Motion to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Keith Leffler (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 3/26/2010. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
March 26, 2010 REDACTION NOTICE: In accordance with section G of the Administrative Procedures Governing Filing and Service by Electronic Means, redacted versions of sealed documents shall be filed electronically within 7 days of the filing of the sealed document. The records of this case do not reflect the filing of a redacted version of DI # 2374 . (nms)
March 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2386 ORDER Granting (1985 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF, 2383 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF) PROPOSED ORDER reducing the objection time from no later than 20 days from the date of the Order, to no later than 2 days from the date of the Order re (2382 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1984 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master. Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 3/24/2010. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
March 23, 2010 Filing 2385 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Regarding Revised Briefing Schedule On Class Plaintiffs' Sanctions Motion re (2320 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1926 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF) Order, by Phil Paul. (Athey, J.)
March 23, 2010 Filing 2384 Letter to The Honorable Vincent J. Popopiti from J. Clayton Athey regarding Response to Intel's Letter of March 18, 2010 Regarding Tyler v. Alltel Corp.. (Athey, J.)
March 22, 2010 Filing 2383 PROPOSED ORDER reducing the objection time from no later than 20 days from the date of the Order, to no later than 2 days from the date of the Order re (2382 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1984 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master. Signed by Special Master Vincent J. Poppiti on 3/22/2010. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
March 22, 2010 Filing 2382 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master Granting in Part, Intel Corporation's Objections to Class Plaintiffs' [Proposed] Pre-Hearing Order (D.I. 2324). Signed by Special Master Vincent J. Poppiti on 3/22/2010. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
March 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2381 ORDER Granting Stipulation and Order Granting Intel's Motion to De-Designate (DM 45). Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 3/19/2010. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
March 19, 2010 CORRECTING ENTRY: The docket text and attachments to (1981 and 1982 in 05-cv-485-JJF, and 2379 and 2380 in 05-md-1717-JJF) have been amended per counsel's request. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
March 18, 2010 Filing 2380 NOTICE of Deposition and Document Request for Mark Friedman on March 26, 2010 at 9:30 a.m. by Phil Paul (Attachments: # 1 Schedule A)(Herbert, Laina) Modified on 3/19/2010 (nms). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/19/2010: # 1 Schedule A) (nms).
March 18, 2010 Filing 2379 NOTICE of Deposition and Document Request for Arnold Barnett on March 23, 2010 at 8:00 a.m. by Phil Paul (Attachments: # 1 Schedule A)(Herbert, Laina) Modified on 3/19/2010 (nms). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/19/2010: # 1 Schedule A) (nms).
March 18, 2010 Filing 2378 Letter to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti from Richard L. Horwitz regarding recent decision that is relevant to question of whether to certify this action as a joint trial of 26 statewide classes as proposed by plaintiffs. (Horwitz, Richard)
March 17, 2010 Filing 2377 NOTICE of Deposition of Brandon Leatha on March 24, 2010 at 9:00 a.m. by Phil Paul (Attachments: # 1 Schedule A)(Herbert, Laina)
March 16, 2010 Filing 2375 Letter to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti from Richard L. Horwitz regarding enclosing Exhibit A to Declaration of Dr. Arnold Barnett - re (2358 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1961 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF) Declaration. (Horwitz, Richard)
March 16, 2010 Filing 2374 SEALED STATEMENT of Errata re (2270 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 2271 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF, and 2272 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF) Declarations, by Intel Corporation. (Horwitz, Richard) Modified on 3/17/2010 (nms).
March 16, 2010 CORRECTING ENTRY: D.I. 2371 has been removed from the docket per the Special Master's request as this filing was in error. Counsel was directed to submit the document directly to the Special Master's office and not on the docket. (nms)
March 12, 2010 Filing 2373 NOTICE of Subpoena Ad Testificandum of David P. Kaplan on April 1, 2010 at 9:00 a.m. by Phil Paul (Attachments: # 1 Subpoena)(Herbert, Laina)
March 9, 2010 Filing 2372 Letter to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti from J. Clayton Athey regarding Reply to Intel's Letter of March 4, 2010. (Athey, J.)
March 8, 2010 Filing 2376 Letter to the Court, dated 2/22/2010, from Concetta Melidona regarding request of Letters Rogatory. (nms)
March 5, 2010 Filing 2370 REDACTED VERSION of (1960 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF, 2357 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF) Declaration of Brian C. Rocca, by Intel Corporation. (Drane, W.) Modified on 3/8/2010 (nms).
March 5, 2010 Filing 2369 REDACTED VERSION of # 2355 Proposed Order, by Intel Corporation. (Drane, W.) Modified on 3/8/2010 (nms). Modified on 3/8/2010 (nms). Modified on 3/8/2010 (nms).
March 5, 2010 Filing 2368 REDACTED VERSION of (2356 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF) MEMORANDUM in Support of Intel's Motion to Strike the Declaration of Shaun M. Simmons (DM 44) by Intel Corporation. (Drane, W.)
March 5, 2010 Filing 2367 REDACTED VERSION of (2358 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1961 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF) Declaration of Arnold Barnett (DM 44), by Intel Corporation. (Drane, W.) Modified on 3/8/2010 (nms).
March 5, 2010 Filing 2366 REDACTED VERSION of (2353 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1956 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF) Declaration of Mark Friedman, by Intel Corporation. (Drane, W.) Modified on 3/8/2010 (nms).
March 5, 2010 Filing 2365 REDACTED VERSION of (2352 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1955 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF) Declaration of Brandon Leatha, by Intel Corporation. (Drane, W.) Modified on 3/8/2010 (nms).
March 5, 2010 Filing 2364 REDACTED VERSION of (1954 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF, 2351 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF) Declaration of John H. Jessen, (Volume 2 of 2), by Intel Corporation. (Drane, W.) Modified on 3/8/2010 (nms).
March 5, 2010 Filing 2363 REDACTED VERSION of (1953 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF, 2350 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF) Declaration of John H. Jessen, (Volume 1 of 2), by Intel Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Volume 1, Part 2, # 2 Volume 1, Part 3, # 3 Volume 1, Part 4, # 4 Volume 1, Part 5)(Drane, W.) Modified on 3/8/2010 (nms).
March 5, 2010 Filing 2362 REDACTED VERSION of (1952 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF, 2349 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF) Declaration of David C. Beach, (Volume 3), by Intel Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Volume 3, Part 2, # 2 Volume 3, Part 3, # 3 Volume 3, Part 4)(Drane, W.) Modified on 3/8/2010 (nms).
March 5, 2010 Filing 2361 REDACTED VERSION of (2348 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1951 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF) Declaration of David C. Beach, (Volume 2 of 3), by Intel Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Volume 2, Part 2)(Drane, W.) Modified on 3/8/2010 (nms).
March 5, 2010 Filing 2360 REDACTED VERSION of (1950 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF, 2347 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF) Declaration of David C. Beach, by Intel Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Volume 1, part 2)(Drane, W.) Modified on 3/8/2010 (nms).
March 5, 2010 Filing 2359 REDACTED VERSION of (2346 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1949 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF) Answering Brief in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions For Intel's Failure to Preserve Evidence (DM 44), by Intel Corporation. (Drane, W.) Modified on 3/8/2010 (nms).
March 5, 2010 Filing 2358 SEALED DECLARATION of Arnold Barnett re (2354 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1957 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF) MOTION to Strike The Declaration of Shaun M. Simmons (DM 44), by Intel Corporation. (Drane, W.) Modified on 3/8/2010 (nms).
March 5, 2010 Filing 2357 SEALED DECLARATION of Brian C. Rocca re (2354 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1957 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF) MOTION to Strike The Declaration of Shaun M. Simmons (DM 44), by Intel Corporation. (Drane, W.) Modified on 3/8/2010 (nms).
March 5, 2010 Filing 2356 SEALED MEMORANDUM in Support re # 2354 MOTION to Strike The Declaration of Shaun M. Simmons (DM 44) filed by Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 3/22/2010. (Drane, W.)
March 5, 2010 Filing 2355 SEALED PROPOSED ORDER re (2354 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1957 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF) MOTION to Strike The Declaration of Shaun M. Simmons (DM 44), by Intel Corporation. (Drane, W.) Modified on 3/8/2010 (nms).
March 5, 2010 Filing 2354 MOTION to Strike The Declaration of Shaun M. Simmons (DM 44) - filed by Intel Corporation. (Drane, W.)
March 5, 2010 Filing 2353 SEALED DECLARATION of Mark Friedman re (2346 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1949 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF) Answering Brief in Opposition (DM 44), by Intel Corporation. (Drane, W.) Modified on 3/8/2010 (nms).
March 5, 2010 Filing 2352 SEALED DECLARATION of Brandon Leatha re (2346 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1949 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF) Answering Brief in Opposition, (DM 44), by Intel Corporation. (Drane, W.) Modified on 3/8/2010 (nms).
March 5, 2010 Filing 2351 SEALED DECLARATION of John H. Jessen re (2346 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1953 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF, 2350 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF) Declaration In Support of Defendant Intel Corporation's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion For Sanctions (DM 44), (Volume 2 of 2, Exhibits 14-34), by Intel Corporation. (Drane, W.) Modified on 3/8/2010 (nms).
March 5, 2010 Filing 2350 SEALED DECLARATION of John H. Jessen re (2346 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1949 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF) Answering Brief in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion For Sanctions (DM 44),(Volume 1 of 2, Exhibits 1-13), by Intel Corporation. (Drane, W.) Modified on 3/8/2010 (nms).
March 5, 2010 Filing 2349 SEALED DECLARATION of David C. Beach re (2346 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1950 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF, 2347 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 2348 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1951 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF, 1949 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF) Answering Brief in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion For Sanctions (DM 44), (Volume 3 of 3) (Exhibits 62-87), by Intel Corporation. (Drane, W.) Modified on 3/8/2010 (nms).
March 5, 2010 Filing 2348 SEALED DECLARATION of David C. Beach re (2346 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1950 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF, 2347 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1949 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF) Answering Brief in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion For Sanctions (DM 44), (Volume 2 of 3) (Exhibits 26-61), by Intel Corporation. (Drane, W.) Modified on 3/8/2010 (nms).
March 5, 2010 Filing 2347 SEALED DECLARATION of David C. Beach re (2346 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF, and 1949 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF) Answering Brief in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion For Sanctions (DM 44), (Volume 1 of 3) (Exhibits 1-25), by Intel Corporation. (Drane, W.) Modified on 3/8/2010 (nms).
March 5, 2010 Filing 2346 SEALED ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re # 2291 MOTION for Sanctions Intel Corporation's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion For Sanctions For Intel's Failure to Preserve Evidence (DM 44) filed by Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 3/15/2010. (Drane, W.)
March 4, 2010 Filing 2345 Letter to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti from Chad M. Shandler regarding Response to Intel's letter of March 4, 2010 - re (2342 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1888 in 1:05-cv-00441-JJF) Letter. (Shandler, Chad)
March 4, 2010 Filing 2344 Letter to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti from W. Harding Drane, Jr. regarding Response to Class Plaintiffs' March 2, 2010 letter (05-1717, D.I. 2338). (Drane, W.)
March 4, 2010 Filing 2343 SO ORDERED re Order Denying Class Plaintiffs' Motion To Strike D.I. # 2339 . Signed by Special Master Vincent J. Poppiti on 3/4/2010. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
March 4, 2010 Filing 2342 Letter to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti from Richard L. Horwitz regarding Reply to AMD's March 2, 2010 "qualified statement of non-opposition" - re (2340 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1887 in 1:05-cv-00441-JJF) Letter. (Horwitz, Richard)
March 3, 2010 Filing 2341 Letter to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti from J. Clayton Athey regarding objecting and moving to strike Intel's letter of March 2, 2010 regarding the proposed rebuttal testimony of Dr. Noll - re (2333 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1939 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF) Letter. (Athey, J.)
March 2, 2010 Filing 2340 Letter to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti from Frederick L. Cottrell, III regarding AMD's response to Intel's motion to dedesignate. (Cottrell, Frederick)
March 2, 2010 Filing 2339 Letter to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti from W. Harding Drane, Jr. regarding Response to Plaintiffs' March 1, 2010 Letter Brief - re (2333 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1939 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF) Letter. (Drane, W.)
March 2, 2010 Filing 2338 Letter to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti from J. Clayton Athey regarding D.M. No. 26, Notice of Subsequent Authority. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-G)(Athey, J.)
March 2, 2010 Filing 2337 Letter/ORDER to Counsel Denying AMD's request for further delay of response period (see Letter/Order for further details). Signed by Special Master Vincent J. Poppiti on 3/2/2010. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
March 2, 2010 Filing 2336 REDACTED VERSION of (1931 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF, 2325 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF) Response to Intel Corporation's Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law, (Part 1 of 2) by Phil Paul. (Attachments: # 1 Response to Intel Corporation's Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law, (Part 2 of 2)(Herbert, Laina) Modified on 3/3/2010 (nms).
March 2, 2010 Filing 2335 Letter to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti from W. Harding Drane, Jr. regarding Response to AMD's Letter Brief of March 1, 2010 - re (1884 in 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 2334 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF) Letter. (Drane, W.) Modified on 3/3/2010 (nms).
March 1, 2010 Filing 2334 Letter to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti from Chad M. Shandler regarding request for additional time to respond to Intel's motion to dedesignate. (Shandler, Chad)
March 1, 2010 Filing 2333 Letter to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti from James L. Holzman regarding response to Intel's February 25, 2010 letter - re (2330 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1936 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF) Letter,. (Holzman, James)
March 1, 2010 Filing 2332 REDACTED VERSION of (2326 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1932 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF) Declaration of Kevin H. Davenport in Support of Class Plaintiffs' Response to Intel Corporation's Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by Phil Paul. (Herbert, Laina)
February 26, 2010 Filing 2331 Letter to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti from J. Clayton Athey regarding further support for Class Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification - re (753 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF, 916 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF) MOTION to Certify Class. (Attachments: # 1 Gintis v. Bouchard Transportation)(Athey, J.)
February 25, 2010 Filing 2330 Letter to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti from W. Harding Drane, Jr. regarding Objections to Class Plaintiffs' [Proposed] Pre-Hearing Order (D.I.2324) - re (1930 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF, 2324 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF) Proposed Pretrial Order. (Drane, W.)
February 24, 2010 Filing 2329 REDACTED VERSION of (1929 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF, 2323 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF) Intel Corporation's Pre-Hearing Order, by Intel Corporation. (Drane, W.) Modified on 2/25/2010 (nms).
February 24, 2010 Filing 2328 REDACTED VERSION of (1927 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF, 2321 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF) Response to Plaintiffs' Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law, by Intel Corporation. (Drane, W.) Modified on 2/25/2010 (nms).
February 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2327 ORDER Granting Stipulation and Order Extending AMD's Time To Respond (DM 45). AMD must respond to Intel's Letter by 3/2/2010 (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 2/23/2010. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
February 22, 2010 Filing 2326 SEALED DECLARATION of Kevin H. Davenport re # 2325 Response to Intel Corporation's Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law, by Phil Paul. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 134-154)(Athey, J.) Modified on 2/23/2010 (nms).
February 22, 2010 Filing 2325 SEALED STATEMENT re # 2296 Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law, by Phil Paul. (Athey, J.) Modified on 2/23/2010 (nms).
February 22, 2010 Filing 2324 Proposed Pre-hearing Order regarding Class Certification, by Phil Paul. (Athey, J.) Modified on 2/23/2010 (nms). Modified on 2/23/2010 (nms).
February 22, 2010 Filing 2323 SEALED Proposed Pre-hearing Order regarding Class Certification, by Intel Corporation. (Drane, W.) Modified on 2/23/2010 (nms).
February 22, 2010 Filing 2322 SEALED DECLARATION of Sujal J. Shah re # 2321 Sealed Response in Support of Defendant Intel Corporation's Response to Plaintiffs' Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law (Attachments: Exhibits 1-27), by Intel Corporation. (Drane, W.) Modified on 2/23/2010 (nms).
February 22, 2010 Filing 2321 SEALED Response re # 2298 to Plaintiffs' Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law (Attached: Appendix A), by Intel Corporation (Drane, W.) Modified on 2/23/2010 (nms).
February 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2320 ORDER Granting Stipulation and Order Regarding Briefing Schedule on Class Plaintiffs' Sanctions Motion (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 2/21/2010. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
February 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2319 ORDER Granting Stipulation and Order Extending AMD's Time to Respond (DM 44). Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 2/17/2010. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
February 16, 2010 Filing 2318 REDACTED VERSION of # 2301 Declaration of Kevin H. Davenport in Support of Class Plaintiffs' Proposed Findings of Fact and Reply to Intel's Opposition to Class Plaintiffs' Preliminary Trial Plan, by Phil Paul. (Athey, J.) Modified on 2/17/2010 (nms).
February 16, 2010 Filing 2317 Letter to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti from J. Clayton Athey regarding Yokoyama revised opinion dated February 8, 2010 - re (1905 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF, 2299 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF) Statement. (Attachments: # 1 Yokoyama Order and Opinion)(Athey, J.)
February 16, 2010 Filing 2316 REDACTED VERSION of # 2297 Reply to Intel's Opposition to Class Plaintiffs' Preliminary Trial Plan, by Phil Paul. (Athey, J.) Modified on 2/17/2010 (nms).
February 16, 2010 Filing 2315 REDACTED VERSION of (2311 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1879 in 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1917 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF) Declaration Volume II, Exhibits D, Part 2-F to Declaration of Richard L. Horwitz by Intel Corporation. (Drane, W.)
February 16, 2010 Filing 2314 REDACTED VERSION of (1878 in 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1916 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF, 2310 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF) Declaration of Richard L. Horwitz with Exhibits A-D, Part 1, Volume I of II by Intel Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-D, Part 1)(Drane, W.)
February 12, 2010 Filing 2313 REDACTED VERSION of # 2296 Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law Relating to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, by Intel Corporation. (Drane, W.) Modified on 2/16/2010 (nms).
February 11, 2010 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (2295 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1901 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF) Stipulation regarding Facts Relating to Class Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, filed by Intel Corporation. Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 2/11/2010. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
February 9, 2010 Filing 2312 REDACTED VERSION of (2298 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1904 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF) Proposed Findings of Fact Part 1 of 2 by Phil Paul. (Attachments: # 1 Redacted Class Plaintiffs' Proposed Findings of Fact, Part 2 of 2)(Athey, J.)
February 8, 2010 Filing 2311 SEALED DECLARATION of Richard L. Horwitz re # 2310 Declaration (Attachments: Exhibits D (Part 2) thru F, Volume II), by Intel Corporation. (Horwitz, Richard) Modified on 2/9/2010 (nms).
February 8, 2010 Filing 2310 SEALED DECLARATION of Richard L. Horwitz re # 2309 Letter (Attachments: Exhibits A-D, Part 1, Volume 1), by Intel Corporation. (Horwitz, Richard) Modified on 2/9/2010 (nms).
February 8, 2010 Filing 2309 Letter to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti from Richard L. Horwitz regarding Confidential Discovery Material. (Horwitz, Richard)
February 8, 2010 Filing 2308 Letter to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti from J. Clayton Athey regarding responding to Intel's February 3 letter opposing Class Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel production of an unredacted copy of the European Commission's Final Decision - re (1890 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF, 2284 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF) Letter,. (Athey, J.)
February 8, 2010 Filing 2307 REDACTED VERSION of # 2299 Class Plaintiffs' Proposed Conclusions of Law for Certification of a Nationwide Injunctive Class and 26 Statewide Classes, by Phil Paul. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-D, # 2 Exhibit E)(Athey, J.) Modified on 2/9/2010 (nms).
February 8, 2010 Filing 2306 REDACTED VERSION of # 2300 Class Plaintiffs' Proposed Conclusions of Law with Respect to Certifying a Nationwide Class, by Phil Paul. (Athey, J.) Modified on 2/9/2010 (nms).
February 5, 2010 CORRECTING ENTRY: The sealed hard copy versions of D.I. 1904 in 05-cv-485-JJF, and D.I. 2298 in 05-md-1717-JJF, have been replaced with amended versions per counsels request. The new version adds pages that were inadvertently omitted. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
February 5, 2010 Filing 2305 REDACTED VERSION of (2293 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1899 and 1:05-cv-00485-JJF) Declaration of Steve W. Fimmel in Support of Class Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions for Intel's Failure to Preserve Evidence, by Phil Paul. (Holzman, James) Modified on 2/8/2010 (nms).
February 5, 2010 Filing 2304 REDACTED VERSION of (2292 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF, and 1898 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF) MEMORANDUM in Support of Class Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions for Intel's Failure to Preserve Evidence, by Phil Paul. (Holzman, James) Modified on 2/8/2010 (nms).
February 5, 2010 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER : Due to a scheduling conflict, the Pretrial Conference set for February 16, 2010 is CANCELLED and will be rescheduled for a date to be determined. ORDERED by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 2/5/2010. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(dlk)
February 3, 2010 Filing 2303 Letter to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti from W. Harding Drane, Jr. regarding in response to class plaintiffs' letter dated January 26, 2010 - re (1890 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF, 2284 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF) Letter,. (Drane, W.)
February 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2302 ORDER Regarding Class Plaintiffs' Request For Leave To File Additional Brief and Supporting Expert Report Regarding Class Certification. Class Plaintiffs request for leave to respond to Defendants' Sur-Reply and expert report is DENIED. Signed by Special Master Vincent J. Poppiti on 2/2/2010. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
February 1, 2010 Filing 2301 SEALED DECLARATION of Kevin H. Davenport in Support of Class Plaintiffs' Proposed Findings of Fact and Reply to Intel's Opposition to Class Plaintiffs' Preliminary Trial Plan by Phil Paul. (Attachments: # 1 SEALED Exhibits to Declaration of Kevin H. Davenport in Support of Class Plaintiffs' Proposed Findings of Fact and Reply to Intel's Opposition to Class Plaintiffs' Preliminary Trial Plan)(Athey, J.)
February 1, 2010 Filing 2300 SEALED STATEMENT Class Plaintiffs' Proposed Conclusions of Law With Respect to Certifying a Nationwide Class by Phil Paul. (Athey, J.)
February 1, 2010 Filing 2299 SEALED STATEMENT Class Plaintiffs' Proposed Conclusions of Law for Certification of a Nationwide Injunctive Class and 26 Statewide Classes by Phil Paul. (Athey, J.)
February 1, 2010 Filing 2298 SEALED Proposed Findings of Fact by Phil Paul. (Athey, J.) Modified on 2/2/2010 (nms).
February 1, 2010 Filing 2297 SEALED STATEMENT re # 2018 Statement Reply to Intel's Opposition to Class Plaintiffs' Preliminary Trial Plan by Phil Paul. (Athey, J.)
February 1, 2010 Filing 2296 SEALED Proposed Findings of Fact by Intel Corporation. (Drane, W.) Modified on 2/2/2010 (nms).
February 1, 2010 Filing 2295 STIPULATION re Facts Relating to Class Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification by Intel Corporation. (Drane, W.) Modified on 2/2/2010 (nms).
January 29, 2010 Filing 2294 NOTICE of Change of Address by Laina M. Herbert (Herbert, Laina)
January 28, 2010 Filing 2293 SEALED DECLARATION re (1897 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF, 2291 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF) MOTION for Sanctions Declaration of Steve W. Fimmel in Support of Class Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions for Intel's Failure to Preserve Evidence by Phil Paul. (Holzman, James)
January 28, 2010 Filing 2292 SEALED MEMORANDUM in Support re # 2291 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Phil Paul.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 2/16/2010. (Holzman, James)
January 28, 2010 Filing 2291 MOTION for Sanctions - filed by Phil Paul. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Holzman, James)
January 28, 2010 Filing 2290 Letter to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti from James L. Holzman regarding Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions for Intel's Failure to Preserve Evidence. (Holzman, James)
January 28, 2010 Filing 2289 Letter to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti from W. Harding Drane, Jr. regarding in response to Class Plaintiffs' letter dated January 26, 2010 - re (1891 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF, 2285 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF) Letter. (Drane, W.)
January 27, 2010 Filing 2288 REDACTED VERSION of # 898 Plaintiffs' Joint Response to Intel's Preliminary Pretrial Statement, by AMD International Sales & Service LTD, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Hatcher, Laura) Modified on 1/28/2010 (nms).
January 27, 2010 Filing 2287 REDACTED VERSION of # 872 Plaintiffs' Joint Preliminary Case Statement, by AMD International Sales & Service LTD, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Hatcher, Laura) Modified on 1/28/2010 (nms).
January 26, 2010 Filing 2286 NOTICE of Change of Firm Affiliation by Phil Paul (Herbert, Laina)
January 26, 2010 Filing 2285 Letter to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti from James L. Holzman regarding Motion for Class Certification. (Athey, J.)
January 26, 2010 Filing 2284 Letter to Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti from J. Clayton Athey regarding Class Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Intel to produce an unredacted version of the European Commission's May 13, 2009 Final Decision - re (2160 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF) Letter. (Athey, J.)
January 20, 2010 Filing 2283 NOTICE of Filing by Intel Corporation re # 909 Redacted Document, # 1753 Order, and # 889 Redacted Document, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Drane, W.) Modified on 1/21/2010 (nms).
January 15, 2010 Filing 2282 REDACTED VERSION of # 2272 Declaration of David C. Beach in Support of Defendant Intel Corporation's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, (Volume III of III), by Intel Corporation. (Drane, W.) Modified on 1/19/2010 (nms).
January 15, 2010 Filing 2281 REDACTED VERSION of # 2271 Declaration of David C. Beach in Support of Defendant Intel Corporation's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, (Volume II of III), by Intel Corporation. (Drane, W.) Modified on 1/19/2010 (nms).
January 15, 2010 Filing 2280 REDACTED VERSION of # 2270 Declaration of David C. Beach in Support of Defendant Intel Corporation's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, (Volume I of III), by Intel Corporation. (Drane, W.) Modified on 1/19/2010 (nms).
January 15, 2010 Filing 2279 REDACTED VERSION of # 2273 Reply Declaration of David P. Kaplan, by Intel Corporation. (Drane, W.) Modified on 1/19/2010 (nms).
January 15, 2010 Filing 2278 REDACTED VERSION of # 2269 Response to Class Plaintiffs' Preliminary Trial Plan, by Intel Corporation. (Drane, W.) Modified on 1/19/2010 (nms).
January 15, 2010 Filing 2277 REDACTED VERSION of # 2268 Reply Brief in Support of Defendant Intel Corporation's Motion to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Keith Leffler, by Intel Corporation. (Drane, W.) Modified on 1/19/2010 (nms).
January 15, 2010 Filing 2276 REDACTED VERSION of # 2267 Sur-Reply Brief, by Intel Corporation. (Drane, W.) Modified on 1/19/2010 (nms).
January 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2275 SO ORDERED re STIPULATION and Order Regarding Briefing on Defendant Intel Corporation's Motion to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Keith Keffler (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 1/12/2010. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
January 12, 2010 Filing 2274 AMENDED ORDER Requiring Pre-Hearing Order and Scheduling Pre-Hearing Teleconference Regarding Class Certification (see Order for further details). Signed by Special Master Vincent J. Poppiti on 1/12/2010. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
January 11, 2010 Filing 2273 SEALED REPLY DECLARATION of David P. Kaplan re # 2268 Sealed Reply Brief, by Intel Corporation. (Drane, W.) Modified on 1/12/2010 (nms). Modified on 1/15/2010 (nms).
January 11, 2010 Filing 2272 SEALED DECLARATION of David C. Beach re # 2267 Sur-Reply Brief in Support of Defendant Intel Corporation's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification (Volume III of III), by Intel Corporation. (Drane, W.) Modified on 1/12/2010 (nms).
January 11, 2010 Filing 2271 SEALED DECLARATION of David C. Beach re # 2267 Sur-Reply Brief in Support of Defendant Intel Corporation's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification (Volume II of III), by Intel Corporation. (Drane, W.) Modified on 1/12/2010 (nms).
January 11, 2010 Filing 2270 SEALED DECLARATION of David C. Beach re # 2267 Sur-Reply Brief in Support of Defendant Intel Corporation's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification (Volume I of III), by Intel Corporation. (Drane, W.) Modified on 1/12/2010 (nms).
January 11, 2010 Filing 2269 SEALED ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re # 2018 SEALED STATEMENT Class Plaintiffs' Preliminary Trial Plan , filed by Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 1/21/2010. (Drane, W.) Modified on 1/12/2010 (nms). Modified on 1/15/2010 (nms).
January 11, 2010 Filing 2268 SEALED REPLY BRIEF in Support of # 2016 Motion to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Keith Leffler, filed by Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha. (Drane, W.) Modified on 1/12/2010 (nms). Modified on 1/15/2010 (nms).
January 11, 2010 Filing 2267 SEALED SUR-REPLY BRIEF in Opposition to # 916 Motion for Class Certification, filed by Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha. (Drane, W.) Modified on 1/12/2010 (nms). Modified on 1/15/2010 (nms).
December 29, 2009 Filing 2265 NOTICE of Change of Address by Laina M. Herbert (Herbert, Laina)
December 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 2266 ORDER Requiring Pre-Hearing Order and Scheduling Pre-Hearing Teleconference Regarding Class Certification (see Order for further details). Signed by Special Master Vincent J. Poppiti on 12/23/2009. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
December 8, 2009 Filing 2264 Notice of Subsequent Authority in Support of Motion for Class Certification by Phil Paul re (753 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF, 916 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF) MOTION to Certify Class (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Athey, J.) Modified on 12/9/2009 (nms).
December 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 2263 ORDER Granting Stipulation and Order Regarding Class Certification Briefing Schedule (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 12/7/2009. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
December 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 2262 ORDER Granting (1867 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF, 2261 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF, and 1872 in 1:05-cv-00441-JJF) Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice filed by Intel Corporation. Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 12/1/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
November 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 2261 STIPULATION and Order of Dismissal with Prejudice by Intel Corporation. (Horwitz, Richard) Modified on 12/1/2009 (nms).
November 25, 2009 Remark: Per the directive in the Order filed at D.I. 2259 in 05-md-1717-JJF, and D.I. 1870 in 05-cv-441-JJF, the pdfs for certain listed D.I.'s have been replaced with sealed document pages. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF(nms)
November 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 2260 ORDER Granting Stipulation relating to the Confidentiality Agreement and Protective Order that was entered on 9/26/2006 (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 11/25/2009. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
November 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 2259 ORDER Granting Stipulation and Order Regarding Request for In Camera Review of Disputed Document and Evidentiary Hearing (DM 33) (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 11/25/2009. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF(nms)
November 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 2258 ORDER Granting Stipulation and Order Regarding Sanctions Motions, as it relates to Class Plaintiffs (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 11/25/2009. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
November 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 2257 ORDER Granting Stipulation and Order Dismissing Sanctions Motions (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 11/25/2009. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
November 20, 2009 Filing 2256 Letter to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti from W. Harding Drane, Jr. regarding Response to Class Plaintiff's Letter dated November 19, 2009 - re (2255 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1862 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF, 1866 in 1:05-cv-00441-JJF) Letter,. (Drane, W.)
November 19, 2009 Filing 2255 Letter to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti from James L. Holzman regarding the Stipulation and Proposed Order Between Intel and AMD Withdrawing Their Respective Sanctions Motions With Prejudice - re (1861 in 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1857 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF, 2249 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF) Letter. (Holzman, James)
November 18, 2009 Filing 2254 Letter to The Honorable Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. from W. Harding Drane, Jr. regarding Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Subject Matter Based Upon Rule 12(b)(1) - re Oral Order,. (Drane, W.)
November 17, 2009 Filing 2253 Letter to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti with Exhibit A from W. Harding Drane, Jr. regarding Motions for Sanctions. (Drane, W.)
November 17, 2009 Filing 2252 REDACTED VERSION of (1847 in 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 2234 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF) Letter to the Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti with Exhibits A&B by Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha. (Drane, W.)
November 17, 2009 Filing 2250 REDACTED VERSION of (1856 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF, 2248 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1860 in 1:05-cv-00441-JJF) Stipulation and [Proposed] Order With Respect to Certain Data Produced by Tech Data Corporation by Phil Paul. (Herbert, Laina)
November 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 2251 ORDER Granting Stipulation and Order with Respect to Certain Data Produced by Tech Data Corporation. Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 11/16/2009. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
November 16, 2009 Filing 2249 Letter to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti from James L. Holzman regarding Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Dismissing Sanctions Motions. (Holzman, James)
November 16, 2009 REDACTION NOTICE: In accordance with section G of the Administrative Procedures Governing Filing and Service by Electronic Means, redacted versions of sealed documents shall be filed electronically within 5 business days of the filing of the sealed document. The records of this case do not reflect the filing of a redacted version of DI # 2234 . (nms)
November 13, 2009 Filing 2248 SEALED STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order With Respect To Certain Data Produced By Tech Data Corporation by Phil Paul. (Herbert, Laina)
November 12, 2009 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER, In view of the announced settlement between Intel and AMD, the parties shall advise the Court as to whether the MOTIONS to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Subject Matter Based Upon Rule 12(b)(1)(D.I. 1324 in 05-md-1717-JJF, and D.I. 1123 in 05-cv-485-JJF) pending in these actions still require resolution as to the Class Complaint. ORDERED by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 11/12/2009. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms) Modified on 11/12/2009 (nms).
November 10, 2009 Filing 2247 REDACTED VERSION of (2223 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1836 in 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1839 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF) Stipulation and [Proposed] Order With Respect To Certain Data Produced By Staples, Inc. by Phil Paul. (Herbert, Laina)
November 9, 2009 Filing 2246 SO ORDERED re Stipulation and Order Regarding the Parties' Evidence Preservation Motions. Signed by Special Master Vincent J. Poppiti on 11/9/2009. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
November 9, 2009 Filing 2245 SO ORDERED re Stipulation and Order Regarding Class Certification Briefing Schedule. Signed by Special Master Vincent J. Poppiti on 11/9/2009. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
November 5, 2009 Filing 2244 REDACTED VERSION of (2208 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1821 in 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1825 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF) Declaration, of James S. Venit in Support of Intel's Opposition to AMD's Motion to Compel Production of the Confidential Version of the European Commission's Decision in Case Comp/37.990-Intel by Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha, Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha. (Drane, W.)
November 5, 2009 Filing 2243 REDACTED VERSION of (1824 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF, 1820 in 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 2207 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF) Declaration, of Daniel S. Floyd in Support of Intel's Opposition to AMD's Motion to compel Production of the Confidential Version of the European Commission's Decision in Case Comp/37.990 - Intel by Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha, Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha. (Drane, W.)
November 5, 2009 Filing 2242 REDACTED VERSION of (1823 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF, 2206 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1819 in 1:05-cv-00441-JJF) Letter, to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti in opposition to AMD's October 6, 2009 letter by Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha, Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha. (Drane, W.)
November 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 2241 ORDER Granting Stipulation and Case Management Order No. 14 (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 11/3/2009. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
November 3, 2009 Filing 2240 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Expert Report of Roger E. Bohn, Ph.D. by Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha, Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha.(Drane, W.)
November 3, 2009 Filing 2239 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Intel Corporation's and Intel Kabushiki Kaisha's Third Supplemental Expert Witness Disclosure (Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2)(A)) with Certificate of Service by Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha, Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha.(Drane, W.)
November 3, 2009 REDACTION NOTICE: In accordance with section G of the Administrative Procedures Governing Filing and Service by Electronic Means, redacted versions of sealed documents shall be filed electronically within 5 business days of the filing of the sealed document. The records of this case do not reflect the filing of redacted versions of DI # 2206 , # 2207 , and # 2208 . (nms)
November 3, 2009 Filing 2238 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Motion by AMD International Sales & Service LTD, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc. re # 2225 Letter (Cottrell, Frederick)
October 30, 2009 Filing 2237 REDACTED VERSION of # 2226 Declaration by AMD International Sales & Service LTD, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Q)(Cottrell, Frederick)
October 30, 2009 Filing 2236 REDACTED VERSION of # 2225 Letter by AMD International Sales & Service LTD, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Cottrell, Frederick)
October 30, 2009 Filing 2235 REDACTED VERSION of # 2224 Letter by AMD International Sales & Service LTD, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Cottrell, Frederick)
October 30, 2009 Filing 2234 SEALED Letter to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti with Exhibits A&B from W. Harding Drane, Jr. regarding response to AMD's motion to compel further deposition testimony (DM 35). (Drane, W.)
October 29, 2009 Filing 2233 NOTICE OF SERVICE of AMD's Preliminary List of Third-Party Deposition Designations by AMD International Sales & Service LTD, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc..(Cottrell, Frederick)
October 29, 2009 Filing 2232 Letter to Special Master Poppiti, dated 10/26/2009, from M. Tatsuya Mori, CEO of NEC Computers S.A.S, responding to a request for certain documentation. (nms)
October 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 2231 ORDER Granting Stipulation and Order Extending AMD's Time To Respond to the NEC Letter to November 2, 2009. Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 10/27/2009. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
October 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 2230 SEALED ORDER Granting Stipulation and Order With Respect To Certain Data Produced by Staples, Inc.. Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 10/27/2009. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
October 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 2229 ORDER Granting Stipulation and Order Modifying Case Management Order #11 and Resolving DM9 (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 10/27/2009. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
October 27, 2009 Filing 2228 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Expert Reports of Frederick Jay Pollack and Edward A. Snyder, Ph.D. by Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha, Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha.(Drane, W.)
October 27, 2009 Filing 2227 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Intel Corporation's and Intel Kabushiki Kaisha's Second Supplemental Expert Witness Disclosure (Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2)(A) by Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha, Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha.(Drane, W.)
October 23, 2009 Filing 2226 SEALED DECLARATION of Jeffrey J. Fowler re # 2225 Letter by AMD International Sales & Service LTD, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Cottrell, Frederick) Modified on 10/26/2009 (nms).
October 23, 2009 Filing 2225 SEALED Letter to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti from Frederick L. Cottrell, III regarding AMD's motion to compel Intel to provide further Rule 30(b)(6) testimony (DM35). (Cottrell, Frederick)
October 23, 2009 Filing 2224 SEALED Letter to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti, Special Master from Frederick L. Cottrell, III regarding unredacted Final Decision. (Cottrell, Frederick)
October 23, 2009 Filing 2223 SEALED STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order With Respect to Certain Data Produced by Staples, Inc. by Phil Paul. (Herbert, Laina)
October 23, 2009 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re # 2215 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Darin W. Snyder filed by AMD International Sales & Service LTD, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 10/23/2009. (nms)
October 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 2222 ORDER Granting Stipulation and Case Management Order No. 13 (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 10/23/2009. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
October 22, 2009 Filing 2221 REDACTED VERSION of (2174 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1787 in 1:05-cv-00441-JJF) Supplemental Declaration of Michael Quinn by Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha, Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha. (Drane, W.) Modified on 10/23/2009 (nms).
October 22, 2009 Filing 2220 REDACTED VERSION of (1787 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF, 2168 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1781 in 1:05-cv-00441-JJF) Letter to the Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti, dated October 8, 2009 by Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha, Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha. (Drane, W.)
October 22, 2009 Filing 2219 REDACTED VERSION of (1788 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF, 2169 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1782 in 1:05-cv-00441-JJF) Declaration of Michael Lee in Support of Defendants' Motion for an Extension of Time to Respond to AMD's Amended Expert Reports by Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha, Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha. (Drane, W.)
October 22, 2009 Filing 2218 REDACTED VERSION of (2173 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1786 in 1:05-cv-00441-JJF) Letter to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti by Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha, Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha. (Drane, W.)
October 22, 2009 Filing 2217 REDACTED VERSION of (2170 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1789 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF) Declaration of Michael Quinn in Support of Defendants' Motion for An Extension of Time to Respond to AMD's Amended Expert Reports by Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha. (Drane, W.) Modified on 10/23/2009 (nms).
October 22, 2009 Filing 2216 NOTICE of Intel's Notice of Subpoena to Shaun Simmons by Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha, Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha (Drane, W.)
October 22, 2009 Filing 2215 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Darin W. Snyder - filed by Advanced Micro Devices, Inc., AMD International Sales & Service LTD, AMD International Sales & Service LTD, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Fineman, Steven)
October 21, 2009 Filing 2214 NOTICE of Notice of Subpoena to Sanjeev Srivastav by Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha, Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha (Drane, W.)
October 21, 2009 Filing 2213 NOTICE of Intel's Notice of Subpoena to Tony Cardine by Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha (Drane, W.)
October 21, 2009 REDACTION NOTICE: In accordance with section G of the Administrative Procedures Governing Filing and Service by Electronic Means, redacted versions of sealed documents shall be filed electronically within 5 business days of the filing of the sealed document. The records of this case do not reflect the filing of redacted versions of DI # 2168 , # 2169 , and # 2170 . (nms)
October 21, 2009 Filing 2212 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Intel Corporation's and Intel Kabushiki Kaisha's Supplemental Expert Witness Disclosure (Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2)(A) with Certificate of Service by Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha, Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha.(Drane, W.)
October 21, 2009 Filing 2211 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Intel Corporation's and Intel Kabushiki Kaisha's Initial Expert Witness Disclosure (Fed. Ru. Civ. P. 26(a)(2)(A) with Certificate of Service by Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha, Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha.(Drane, W.)
October 21, 2009 CORRECTING ENTRY: D.I. 2204 and D.I. 2209 have been removed from the docket as they were inappropriately filed. Counsel will refer to Local Rule 5.4(b) when filing materials relating to discovery. (nms)
October 21, 2009 Filing 2210 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Expert Report of Professor Kevin M. Murphy by Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha, Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha.(Drane, W.)
October 20, 2009 Filing 2208 SEALED DECLARATION re (1823 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF, 2206 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1819 in 1:05-cv-00441-JJF) Letter, Declaration of James S. Venit in Support of Intel's Opposition to AMD's Motion to Compel Production of the Confidential Version of the European Commission's Decision in Case Comp/37.990 - Intel with Exhibits 1-3 and Certificate of Service by Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha, Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha. (Drane, W.)
October 20, 2009 Filing 2207 SEALED DECLARATION re (1823 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF, 2206 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1819 in 1:05-cv-00441-JJF) Letter, Declaration of Daniel S. Floyd in Support of Intel's Opposition to AMD's Motion to Compel Production of the Confidential Version of the European Commission's Decision in Case Comp/37.990-Intel with Exhibits 1-7 and Certificate of Service by Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha, Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha. (Drane, W.)
October 20, 2009 Filing 2206 SEALED Letter to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti from W. Harding Drane, Jr. regarding responding to AMD's October 6, 2009 letter, moving to compel production of the confidential version of the European Commission's Decision - re (2160 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF) Letter, (1773 in 1:05-cv-00441-JJF) Letter. (Drane, W.)
October 20, 2009 Filing 2205 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Expert Reports for Judith A Chevalier; Robin Cooper, D.B.A.; Dr. Gary J. Dorman and Mark L. Van Name by Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha, Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha.(Drane, W.)
October 19, 2009 Filing 2203 REDACTED VERSION of # 2194 Declaration by AMD International Sales & Service LTD, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Cottrell, Frederick)
October 19, 2009 Filing 2202 REDACTED VERSION of # 2195 Declaration by AMD International Sales & Service LTD, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Cottrell, Frederick)
October 19, 2009 Filing 2201 REDACTED VERSION of # 2196 Declaration by AMD International Sales & Service LTD, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - 71)(Cottrell, Frederick)
October 19, 2009 Filing 2200 REDACTED VERSION of # 2193 Declaration by AMD International Sales & Service LTD, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Part 1, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Part 2, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6 - Part 1, # 8 Exhibit 6 - Part 2, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit 9)(Cottrell, Frederick)
October 19, 2009 Filing 2199 Letter to Special Master Poppiti, dated 10/13/2009, from NEC Computers S.A.S, regarding AMD's Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Incorporation of Packard Bell BV )(nms)
October 16, 2009 Filing 2198 REDACTED VERSION of # 2172 Declaration by AMD International Sales & Service LTD, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - 6)(Cottrell, Frederick)
October 16, 2009 Filing 2197 REDACTED VERSION of # 2171 Letter by AMD International Sales & Service LTD, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Cottrell, Frederick)
October 14, 2009 Filing 2196 SEALED DECLARATION OF OBERTA H. VESPREMI re # 2189 MOTION for Sanctions by AMD International Sales & Service LTD, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Cottrell, Frederick) Modified on 10/15/2009 (nms).
October 14, 2009 Filing 2195 SEALED DECLARATION re # 2189 MOTION for Sanctions (DECLARATION OF TONY CARDINE) by AMD International Sales & Service LTD, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Cottrell, Frederick)
October 14, 2009 Filing 2194 SEALED DECLARATION OF SANJEEV SRIVASTAV re # 2189 MOTION for Sanctions by AMD International Sales & Service LTD, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Cottrell, Frederick) Modified on 10/15/2009 (nms).
October 14, 2009 Filing 2193 SEALED DECLARATION OF SHAUN M. SIMMONS re # 2189 MOTION for Sanctions by AMD International Sales & Service LTD, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Cottrell, Frederick) Modified on 10/15/2009 (nms).
October 14, 2009 Filing 2192 REDACTED VERSION of # 2191 Opening Brief in Support by AMD International Sales & Service LTD, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Cottrell, Frederick)
October 14, 2009 CORRECTING ENTRY: D.I. 2195 in 05-Md-1717-JJF, # 1805 in 05-cv-441-JJF, and #1809 in 05-cv-485-JJF, Redacted versions of filings have been removed from the dockets per counsel's request. Counsel will refile. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
October 14, 2009 Filing 2191 SEALED OPENING BRIEF in Support re # 2189 MOTION for Sanctions filed by AMD International Sales & Service LTD, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 11/2/2009. (Cottrell, Frederick)
October 14, 2009 Filing 2190 REDACTED VERSION of # 2183 Exhibits to the Declaration of Brian C. Rocca, Volume 4 of 4 (Nos. 47-73) by Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha, Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha. (Drane, W.) Modified on 10/15/2009 (nms).
October 14, 2009 Filing 2189 MOTION for Sanctions - filed by AMD International Sales & Service LTD, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cottrell, Frederick)
October 14, 2009 Filing 2188 REDACTED VERSION of # 2182 Exhibits to the Declaration of Brian C. Rocca, Volume 3 of 4 (Nos. 30-46) by Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha, Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha. (Drane, W.) Modified on 10/15/2009 (nms).
October 14, 2009 Filing 2187 REDACTED VERSION of # 2181 Exhibits to the Declaration of Brian C. Rocca, Volume 2 of 4 (Nos. 13-29) by Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha, Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha. (Drane, W.) Modified on 10/15/2009 (nms).
October 14, 2009 Filing 2186 REDACTED VERSION of # 2180 Exhibits to the Declaration of Brian C. Rocca, Volume 1 of 4 (Nos. 1-12) by Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha, Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha. (Drane, W.) Modified on 10/15/2009 (nms).
October 14, 2009 Filing 2185 REDACTED VERSION of # 2179 Declaration of Brian C. Rocca in Support of {2177] Motion for an Order Imposing Sanctions Against AMD and Compelling Remediation by Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha, Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha. (Drane, W.) Modified on 10/15/2009 (nms).
October 14, 2009 Filing 2184 REDACTED VERSION of # 2178 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion For an Order Imposing Sanctions Against AMD and Compelling Remediation by Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha, Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha. (Drane, W.) Modified on 10/15/2009 (nms).
October 14, 2009 Filing 2183 SEALED EXHIBIT (Volume 4 of 4 (Nos. 47-73)) re # 2179 Declaration of Brian C. Rocca by Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha, Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha. (Drane, W.) Modified on 10/15/2009 (nms).
October 14, 2009 Filing 2182 SEALED EXHIBIT (Volume 3 of 4 (Nos. 30-46)) ree # 2179 Declaration of Brian C. Rocca by Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha, Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha. (Drane, W.) Modified on 10/15/2009 (nms).
October 14, 2009 Filing 2181 SEALED EXHIBIT (Volume 2 of 4 (Nos. 13-29) re # 2179 Declaration of Brian C. Rocca by Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha, Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha. (Drane, W.) Modified on 10/15/2009 (nms).
October 14, 2009 Filing 2180 SEALED EXHIBIT (Volume 1 of 4 (Nos. 1-12)) re # 2179 Declaration of Brian C. Rocca by Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha, Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha. (Drane, W.) Modified on 10/15/2009 (nms).
October 14, 2009 Filing 2179 SEALED DECLARATION of Brian C. Rocca re # 2177 MOTION for Sanctions and # 2178 Opening Brief in Support of Motion for an Order Imposing Sanctions Against AMD and Compelling Remediation by Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha, Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha. (Drane, W.) Modified on 10/15/2009 (nms).
October 14, 2009 Filing 2178 SEALED OPENING BRIEF in Support re # 2177 MOTION for an Order Imposing Sanctions Against AMD and Compelling Remediation filed by Intel Kabushiki Kaisha, Intel Corporation. Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 11/2/2009. (Drane, W.) Modified on 10/15/2009 (nms).
October 14, 2009 Filing 2177 MOTION For An Order Imposing Sanctions Against AMD And Compelling Remediation - filed by Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha, Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha. (Drane, W.) Modified on 10/15/2009 (nms).
October 14, 2009 Filing 2176 NOTICE OF SERVICE of First Amended Written Response of Advanced Micro Devices, Inc. and AMD International Sales & Service, Ltd. to Intel Corporation's Notice of Deposition Regarding AMD Products, Pursuant to the Parties' Agreement by AMD International Sales & Service LTD, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc..(Cottrell, Frederick)
October 14, 2009 CORRECTING ENTRY: D.I. 2176 in 05-md-1717-JJF, #1789 in 05-cv-441-JJF, and #1793 in 05-cv-485-JJF have been removed from the docket as these were filing of discovery material. Counsel will refile in accordance with Local Rule 5.4(b). Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
October 12, 2009 Filing 2174 SEALED Supplemental DECLARATION of Michael Quinn re # 2173 Letter for an Extension of Time to Respond to AMD's Amended Expert Reports by Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha, Intel Corporation. (Horwitz, Richard) Modified on 10/13/2009 (nms).
October 12, 2009 Filing 2173 SEALED Letter to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti from Richard L. Horwitz regarding Extension of Time to Respond to Amendments. (Horwitz, Richard)
October 10, 2009 Filing 2172 SEALED DECLARATION of Clara Pugsley re # 2171 Letter For An Extension of Time to Respond to AMD's Amended Expert Reports by AMD International Sales & Service LTD, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Cottrell, Frederick) Modified on 10/13/2009 (nms).
October 10, 2009 Filing 2171 SEALED Letter to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti from Frederick L. Cottrell, III regarding AMD's Opposition to Intel's Motion For An Extension of Time to Respond to AMD's Amended Expert Reports. (Cottrell, Frederick)
October 9, 2009 Filing 2175 SO ORDERED re Stipulation and Order Regarding Intel's Motion To Compel Production Of AMD's "Back-End" Manufacturing Data (DM 39). Signed by Special Master Vincent J. Poppiti on 10/9/2009. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
October 9, 2009 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (1775 in 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 2162 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Shaun M. Simmons filed by AMD International Sales & Service LTD, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 10/9/20009. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF(nms)
October 8, 2009 Filing 2170 SEALED DECLARATION re (1787 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF, 2168 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1781 in 1:05-cv-00441-JJF) Letter Declaration of Michael Quinn by Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha, Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha. (Drane, W.)
October 8, 2009 Filing 2169 SEALED DECLARATION re (1787 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF) Letter Sealed Declaration of Michael M. Lee with Exhibits by Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha, Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha. (Drane, W.)
October 8, 2009 Filing 2168 SEALED Letter to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti from W. Harding Drane, Jr. regarding AMD's submission to Intel on October 6, 2009, of amended expert reports. (Drane, W.)
October 8, 2009 Filing 2167 Letter to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti from W. Harding Drane, Jr. regarding withdrawal of Motion to Compel Production of Certain Initial Harvest Dates - re (1769 in 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 2156 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF) Letter. (Drane, W.)
October 8, 2009 Filing 2166 REDACTED VERSION of # 2160 Letter to Special Master, the Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti, by AMD International Sales & Service LTD, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits to letter)(Cottrell, Frederick)
October 8, 2009 Filing 2165 REDACTED VERSION of (1769 in 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 2156 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF) Letter to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti re harvest dates by Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha, Intel Corporation. (Drane, W.)
October 8, 2009 CORRECTING ENTRY: The date for the Final Pretrial Conference has been corrected to read February 16, 2010 due to the Federal Holiday on February 15, 2010. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF(dlk)
October 8, 2009 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Per Case Management Order No. 12, A Final Pretrial Conference is set for 2/16/2010 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF(dlk) Modified on 10/8/2009 (dlk).
October 7, 2009 Filing 2164 NOTICE of Service of Written Responses of Intel Corporation and Intel Kabushika Kaisha to Advanced Micro Devices, Inc. and AMD International Sales & Service, Ltd. Pursuant to the Parties' Agreement with Certificate of Service by Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha, Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha (Drane, W.)
October 7, 2009 Filing 2163 Letter to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti from James L. Holzman regarding AMD's October 6, 2009 letter compelling Intel to produce an unredacted version of the European Commission's May 13, 2009 Final Decision - re (2160 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF) Letter. (Athey, J.)
October 7, 2009 Filing 2162 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Shaun M. Simmons - filed by Advanced Micro Devices, Inc., AMD International Sales & Service LTD, AMD International Sales & Service LTD, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Cottrell, Frederick)
October 7, 2009 Filing 2161 NOTICE of Subpoena Ad Testificandum and Duces Tecum directed to Keith B. Leffler, to appear for deposition on October 8 and 9, 2009, at 9:00 a.m., at the offices of Bingham McCutchen LLP, 2020 K Street NW, Washington, DC by Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha, Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha (Drane, W.)
October 6, 2009 Filing 2160 SEALED Letter to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti from Frederick L. Cottrell, III regarding request to compel Intel to produce the unredacted version of European Commission's Final Decision. (Cottrell, Frederick)
October 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 2159 ORDER ADOPTING (1714 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF, 2079 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1694 in 1:05-cv-00441-JJF) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of the Special Master. Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 10/3/2009. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
October 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 2158 SO ORDERED re (1770 in 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1781 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF, 2157 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF) Proposed Case Management Order No. 12 (DM 41). Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 10/3/2009. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
October 2, 2009 Filing 2157 PROPOSED Case Management Order No. 12 (DM 41) (see Order for further details). Signed by Special Master Vincent J. Poppiti on 10/2/2009. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
October 1, 2009 Filing 2156 SEALED Letter to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti from W. Harding Drane, Jr. with Exhibits A-J regarding Initial Harvest Dates. (Drane, W.)
September 28, 2009 Filing 2155 REDACTED VERSION of # 2107 Declaration of Jay Srinivasan in Support of Intel's Opposition to AMD's Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Submission in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment on AMD's Export Commerce Claim by Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha, Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha. (Drane, W.) Modified on 9/29/2009 (nms).
September 28, 2009 Filing 2154 REDACTED VERSION of # 2106 Intel's Opposition toAMD's Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Submission in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment on AMD's Export Commerce Claim by Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha, Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha. (Drane, W.) Modified on 9/29/2009 (nms).
September 28, 2009 Filing 2153 REDACTED VERSION of # 2122 Second Declaration of Jay Srinivasan in Support of Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion to Compel Production of AMD's Back-End Manufacturing Data by Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha, Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha. (Drane, W.) Modified on 9/29/2009 (nms).
September 28, 2009 Filing 2152 REDACTED VERSION of (1747 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF, 1734 in 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 2121 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF) Letter To The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti re AMD's back-end manufacturing data by Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha, Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha. (Drane, W.)
September 28, 2009 Filing 2151 Letter to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti from W. Harding Drane, Jr. regarding response to David L. Finger's letter requesting that the Special Master fees not be assessed to the Press - re (1725 in 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 2112 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1739 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF) Letter. (Drane, W.)
September 25, 2009 CORRECTING ENTRY: The docket text for D.I. 2149 in 05-md-1717-JJF, D.I. 1762 in 05-cv-441-JJF, and D.I. 1774 in 05-cv-485-JJF, has been corrected to reflect the correct link to the document being redacted. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
September 25, 2009 Filing 2150 REDACTED VERSION of (1732 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF, 1716 in 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 2103 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF) Declaration, of Michael M. Lee in Support of Defendants' Motion to Compel Production of All Back Up Materials Related to the Expert Report of Dr. Daryl Ostrander by Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha, Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha. (Drane, W.)
September 25, 2009 Filing 2149 REDACTED VERSION of # 2102 Letter to the Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti by Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha, Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha. (Drane, W.) Modified on 9/25/2009 (nms).
September 25, 2009 Filing 2148 REDACTED VERSION of # 2135 Letter by AMD International Sales & Service LTD, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - 5)(Cottrell, Frederick)
September 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 2147 SO ORDERED re (1737 in 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 2124 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1750 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF) Proposed ORDER reducing the objection time from 20 to 5 days re (1736 in 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1749 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF, 2123 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master re Defendants Intel Corporation And Intel Kabushiki Kaisha Motion To Compel Plaintiffs, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc. And AMD International Sales & Service, Ltd. To Comply With Topic 21 Of Its Notice Of Deposition Pursuant To Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(B)(6). Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 9/24/2009. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
September 24, 2009 Filing 2146 REDACTED VERSION of # 2119 Declaration of Xin-Yi Zhou in Support of its Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Submission in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment on AMD's Export Commerce Claim by AMD International Sales & Service LTD, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Cottrell, Frederick)
September 24, 2009 Filing 2145 REDACTED VERSION of # 2118 Reply Brief, in Support of its Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Submission in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment on AMD's Export Commerce Claim by AMD International Sales & Service LTD, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Cottrell, Frederick)
September 24, 2009 Filing 2144 REDACTED VERSION of # 2086 Declaration of Jay Srinivasan in Support of Defendants' Motion to Compel Production of AMD's Back-End Manufacturing Data by Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha, Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha. (Drane, W.) Modified on 9/25/2009 (nms).
September 24, 2009 Filing 2143 REDACTED VERSION of # 2085 Letter to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti re: motion to compel back-end manufacturing data by Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha, Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha. (Drane, W.) Modified on 9/25/2009 (nms).
September 23, 2009 Filing 2142 REDACTED VERSION of (1741 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF, 1728 in 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 2115 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF) Stipulation and [Proposed] Order with Respect to Certain Data Produced by Dell by Phil Paul. (Athey, J.)
September 23, 2009 REDACTION NOTICE: In accordance with section G of the Administrative Procedures Governing Filing and Service by Electronic Means, redacted versions of sealed documents shall be filed electronically within 5 business days of the filing of the sealed document. The records of this case do not reflect the filing of redacted versions of DI # 2106 and # 2107 . (nms)
September 23, 2009 Filing 2141 REDACTED VERSION of # 2111 Declaration, of Michael M. Maddigan by AMD International Sales & Service LTD, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Shandler, Chad)
September 23, 2009 Filing 2140 REDACTED VERSION of # 2110 Letter to the Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti, Special Master by AMD International Sales & Service LTD, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Shandler, Chad)
September 23, 2009 REDACTION NOTICE: In accordance with section G of the Administrative Procedures Governing Filing and Service by Electronic Means, redacted versions of sealed documents shall be filed electronically within 5 business days of the filing of the sealed document. The records of this case do not reflect the filing of redacted versions of DI # 2102 and # 2103 . (nms)
September 22, 2009 Filing 2139 Official Transcript of Teleconference held on 09-04-09 before Judge Vincent J. Poppiti. Court Reporter/Transcriber Gloria D'Amore. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER ( Redaction Request due 10/13/2009., Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/23/2009., Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/21/2009.). (lad)
September 22, 2009 Filing 2138 Official Transcript of Teleconference held on 08-24-09 before Judge Vincent J. Poppiti. Court Reporter/Transcriber Renee Ewing. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER ( Redaction Request due 10/13/2009., Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/23/2009., Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/21/2009.). (lad)
September 21, 2009 Filing 2137 Letter to Local Counsel, dated 9/21/2009, from Special Master Vincent J. Poppiti, regarding Deposition of Intel and Possible Telephonic Attendance by Special Master. (nms)
September 21, 2009 Filing 2136 Letter to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti from W. Harding Drane, Jr. regarding withdrawal of motion to compel the production of all back-up materials related to the expert report of Dr. Daryl Ostrander (DM 40). (Drane, W.)
September 18, 2009 Filing 2135 SEALED Letter to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti from Frederick L. Cottrell, III regarding opposition to Intel's motion to compel. (Cottrell, Frederick)
September 18, 2009 Filing 2134 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Stephen C. Martson, pursuant to Rules 26 and 30 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure on December 16-18, 2009 by Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha, Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha.(Drane, W.)
September 18, 2009 Filing 2133 NOTICE to Take Deposition of B. Douglas Bernheim, pursuant to Rules 26 and 30 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure on December 3-4, 7-11, 14 and 22-23, 2009 by Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha, Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha.(Drane, W.)
September 18, 2009 Filing 2132 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Thomas Conte, pursuant to Rules 26 and 30 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure on November 30, 2009 by Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha, Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha.(Drane, W.)
September 18, 2009 Filing 2131 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Thomas Z. Lys, pursuant to Rules 26 and 30 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure on December 15-16, 2009 by Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha, Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha.(Drane, W.)
September 18, 2009 Filing 2130 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Nathan Brookwood, pursuant to Rules 26 and 30 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure on December 16-18, 2009 by Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha, Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha.(Drane, W.)
September 18, 2009 Filing 2129 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Daryl Ostrander, pursuant to Rules 26 and 30 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure on December 9-11, 2009 by Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha, Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha.(Drane, W.)
September 18, 2009 Filing 2128 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Mark W. Watson, pursuant to Rules 26 and 30 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure on December 21-23, 2009 by Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha, Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha.(Drane, W.)
September 18, 2009 Filing 2127 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Robert B.K. Dewar, pursuant to Rules 26 and 30 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure on December 1-2, 2009 by Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha, Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha.(Drane, W.)
September 18, 2009 Filing 2126 Letter to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti from Frederick L. Cottrell, III regarding September 29, 2009 deposition of D. Bruce Sewell. (Cottrell, Frederick)
September 18, 2009 Filing 2125 Letter to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti from Richard L. Horwitz regarding Reply to AMD's Opposition to Intel's Motion for Scheduling Modification. (Horwitz, Richard)
September 18, 2009 CORRECTING ENTRY: The docket text for D.I. 2124 in 05-md-1717-JJF, D.I. 1737 in 05-cv-441-JJF, and D.I. 1750 in 05-cv-485-JJF has been amended to reflect that the Proposed Orders were signed by Special Master Vincent J. Poppiti and not Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr.. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
September 18, 2009 Filing 2124 Proposed ORDER reducing the objection time from 20 to 5 days re (1736 in 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1749 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF, 2123 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master re Defendants Intel Corporation And Intel Kabushiki Kaisha's Motion To Compel Plaintiffs, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc. And AMD International Sales & Service, Ltd. To Comply With Topic 21 Of Its Notice Of Deposition Pursuant To Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(B)(6). Signed by Special Master Vincent J. Poppiti on 9/18/2009. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms) Modified on 9/18/2009 (nms).
September 18, 2009 Filing 2123 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master re Defendants Intel Corporation And Intel Kabushiki Kaisha's Motion To Compel Plaintiffs, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc. And AMD International Sales & Service, Ltd. To Comply With Topic 21 Of Its Notice Of Deposition Pursuant To Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(B)(6). Signed by Special Master Vincent J. Poppiti on 9/18/2009. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
September 17, 2009 Filing 2122 SEALED Second DECLARATION of Jay Srinivasan re (1747 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF, 1734 in 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 2121 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF) Letter in Support of Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion to Compel Production of AMD's Back-End Manufacturing Data by Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha, Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha. (Drane, W.) (nms). Modified on 9/18/2009 (nms).
September 17, 2009 Filing 2121 SEALED Letter to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti from W. Harding Drane, Jr. regarding AMD's Back-End Manufacturing Data. (Drane, W.)
September 17, 2009 Filing 2120 NOTICE of filing the following document(s) in multi media format: Zhou Declaration Exhibits A-M. Original material(s) to be filed with the Clerk's Office. Notice filed by Frederick L. Cottrell, III on behalf of AMD International Sales & Service LTD, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc. (Cottrell, Frederick)
September 17, 2009 Filing 2119 SEALED DECLARATION of Xin-Yi Zhou re # 2118 Reply Brief by AMD International Sales & Service LTD, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Cottrell, Frederick) Modified on 9/18/2009 (nms).
September 17, 2009 Filing 2118 SEALED REPLY BRIEF re # 2083 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Submission In Opposition To Defendants' Motion To Dismiss, Or In The Alternative, For Summary Judgment On AMD's Export Commerce Claim filed by AMD International Sales & Service LTD, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Cottrell, Frederick)
September 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 2117 SEALED ORDER Granting (1741 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF, 1728 in 1:05-cv-00441-JJF) Sealed Stipulation and Order With Respect To Certain Data Produced By Dell. Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 9/16/2009. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
September 16, 2009 Filing 2116 SO ORDERED re STIPULATION and Order For Extension of Time for AMD to Respond To Intel's Motion To Compel. Signed by Special Master Vincent J. Poppiti on 9/16/2009. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
September 15, 2009 Filing 2115 SEALED STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order With Respect to Certain Data Produced by Dell by Phil Paul. (Athey, J.)
September 15, 2009 Filing 2114 Letter to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti from Frederick L. Cottrell, III regarding opposition to Intel's requests to postpone the pretrial conference and trial and to enlarge its time to move for summary judgment - re # 2091 Letter,. (Cottrell, Frederick)
September 15, 2009 Filing 2113 Letter to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti, Special Master from Frederick L. Cottrell, III regarding joint report pursuant to Amended Case Management Order No. 6, dated June 20, 2008. (Cottrell, Frederick)
September 15, 2009 Filing 2112 Letter to The Hon. Vincent J. Poppiti from David L. Finger regarding Request for re-allocation of Special Master Fees. (Finger, David)
September 14, 2009 Filing 2111 SEALED DECLARATION of Michael M. Maddigan re # 2110 Letter in Support of AMD's Opposition to Intel's Motion to Compel Production of "Back-End" Manufacturing Data by AMD International Sales & Service LTD, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Shandler, Chad) Modified on 9/15/2009 (nms).
September 14, 2009 Filing 2110 SEALED Letter to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti from Chad M. Shandler regarding response to Intel's September 2, 2009 letter - re # 2085 Letter. (Shandler, Chad)
September 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 2109 SO ORDERED re STIPULATION and Order Regarding Request For In Camera Review Of Disputed Document and Evidentiary Hearing (DM 33) (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 9/11/2009. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF(nms)
September 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 2108 SO ORDERED re STIPULATION and Order Amending The Court's Order Regarding The Issuance Of The French Letter Rogatory - DM 26 (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 9/11/2009. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
September 10, 2009 Filing 2107 SEALED DECLARATION re (1719 in 1:05-cv-00441-JJF) Response to Motion, (1734 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF) Notice (Other), Notice (Other), (2106 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF) Response to Motion, Sealed Declaration of Jay Srinivasan in Support of Intel's Opposition to AMD's Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Submission in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment on AMD's Export Commerce Claim by Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha, Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha. (Drane, W.)
September 10, 2009 Filing 2106 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re # 2083 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Submission In Opposition To Defendants' Motion To Dismiss, Or In The Alternative, For Summary Judgment On AMD's Export Commerce Claim filed by Intel Kabushiki Kaisha, Intel Corporation. (Drane, W.)
September 10, 2009 Filing 2105 SO ORDERED re STIPULATION and Order For Extension Of Time To Respond to Motion To Compel (D.I. 2085 in 05-md-1717-JJF, D.I. 1698 in 05-cv-441-JJF, and D.I. 1718 in 05-cv-485-JJF). Response/Answer Brief due by 9/14/2009. Signed by Special Master Vincent J. Poppiti on 9/10/2009. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
September 10, 2009 Filing 2104 REDACTED VERSION of # 2083 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Submission In Opposition To Defendants' Motion To Dismiss, Or In The Alternative, For Summary Judgment On AMD's Export Commerce Claim by AMD International Sales & Service LTD, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 7.1.1 Certification, # 3 Exhibit A-B)(Cottrell, Frederick)
September 9, 2009 Filing 2103 SEALED DECLARATION of Michael M. Lee in Support of Defendants' Motion to Compel Production of All Back-Up Materials Related to the Expert Report of Dr. Daryl Ostrander with Exhibits 1-8 by Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha, Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha. (Drane, W.)
September 9, 2009 Filing 2102 SEALED Letter to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti from W. Harding Drane, Jr. regarding compel production of all supporting and back-up materials related to AMD Inc.'s and AMD International Sales & Service, Ltd.'s expert report of Dr. Daryl Ostrander.. (Drane, W.)
September 9, 2009 Filing 2101 REDACTED VERSION of (1701 in 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1721 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF, 2088 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF) Stipulation and [Proposed] Order With Respect to Certain Data Produced by Hewlett-Packard by Phil Paul. (Herbert, Laina)
September 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 2100 Sealed ORDER Granting (1701 in 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1721 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF, 2088 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF) Sealed Stipulation and Order With Respect To Certain Data Produced By Hewlett-Packard filed by Phil Paul. Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 9/8/2009. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
September 8, 2009 Filing 2099 Letter to Special Master Vincent J. Poppiti from Chad M. Shandler regarding in camera review of the Joint Presentation Agreement between AMD and class counsel. (Shandler, Chad)
September 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 2098 ORDER Granting (2080 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1715 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF, 1695 in 1:05-cv-00441-JJF) PROPOSED ORDER Reducing the objection time from 20 to 5 days re (1714 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF, 2079 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1694 in 1:05-cv-00441-JJF) SPECIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master (DM 36) re Intel's Motion To Compel, and their Request For Production Of A Privilege Log. Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 9/8/2009. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
September 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 2097 SO ORDERED re (1724 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF, 1707 in 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 2094 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF) Proposed Stipulation And Case Management Order #11 (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 9/8/2009. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
September 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 2096 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for (1662, 1669, 1675 in 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 2038, 2045, 2051 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF, and 1684, 1691, 1694 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF) Report and Recommendations - Special Master. Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 9/8/2009. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
September 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 2095 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for (1699 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF, 1683 in 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, and 2061 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF) Report and Recommendations - Special Master,. Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 9/8/2009. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
September 8, 2009 Remark: Attorney Ali Oromchian terminated from dockets as representing Ian Walker. Mr. Oramchian is no longer at Finkelstein Thompson & Loughran, and is no longer affiliated with the Intel MDL and related matters. Associated Cases: 1:05-cv-00485-JJF, 1:05-cv-00899-JJF, 1:05-md-01717-JJF(rbe) Associated Cases: 1:05-cv-00899-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF, 1:05-md-01717-JJF(rbe)
September 8, 2009 Filing 2091 Letter to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti from Richard L. Horwitz regarding Scheduling Modifications (completion of expert witness depositions, schedule for summary judgment motion briefing, the pre-trial conference date and the trial date). (Horwitz, Richard)
September 4, 2009 Filing 2094 PROPOSED Stipulation and Case Management Order #11 (see Order for further details). Signed by Special Master Vincent J. Poppiti on 9/4/2009. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
September 4, 2009 Filing 2093 Return of Undeliverable Mail sent to Ali Oromchian. Mail returned as "Attempted - Not Known, Unable To Forward." Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
September 4, 2009 Filing 2092 Return of Undeliverable Mail sent to Ali Oromchian. Mail returned as "Not Deliverable As Addressed, Unable To Forward." Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
September 4, 2009 Filing 2090 Letter to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti from Frederick L. Cottrell, III regarding AMD's motion for sanctions. (Cottrell, Frederick)
September 4, 2009 Filing 2089 Letter to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti from W. Harding Drane, Jr. regarding meet and confer regarding filing dates, briefing schedule and page limits relating to the parties' motion practice on preservation issues. (Drane, W.)
September 3, 2009 Filing 2088 SEALED STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order With Respect to Certain Data Produced by Hewlett-Packard by Phil Paul. (Herbert, Laina)
September 2, 2009 Filing 2087 Letter to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti from Frederick L. Cottrell, III regarding extension concerning issue of French letter rogatory request. (Cottrell, Frederick)
September 2, 2009 Filing 2086 SEALED DECLARATION of Jay Srinivasan in Support of Defendants' Motion to Compel Production of AMD's Back-End Manufacturing Data with Exhibits 1-14 by Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha, Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha. (Drane, W.)
September 2, 2009 Filing 2085 SEALED Letter to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti from W. Harding Drane, Jr. regarding motion to compel production of AMD's back-end manufacturing data.. (Drane, W.)
September 2, 2009 Filing 2084 NOTICE OF MOTION by AMD International Sales & Service LTD, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc. re # 2083 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Submission In Opposition To Defendants' Motion To Dismiss, Or In The Alternative, For Summary Judgment On AMD's Export Commerce Claim ; Requesting the following Motion Day: October 15, 2009 (Cottrell, Frederick)
September 2, 2009 Filing 2083 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Submission In Opposition To Defendants' Motion To Dismiss, Or In The Alternative, For Summary Judgment On AMD's Export Commerce Claim - filed by AMD International Sales & Service LTD, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Cottrell, Frederick)
September 2, 2009 Filing 2082 REDACTED VERSION of # 2074 Exhibit to a Document, # 2073 Exhibit to a Document, # 2071 Exhibit to a Document, # 2072 Exhibit to a Document, # 2070 Exhibit to a Document Redacted Version of Annex of Exhibits Cited in the Revised Reply Declaration of Dr. Keith Leffler by Phil Paul. (Athey, J.)
September 2, 2009 Filing 2081 REDACTED VERSION of # 2069 Revised Reply Declaration of Dr. Keith Leffler by Phil Paul. (Athey, J.) Modified on 9/3/2009 (nms).
August 31, 2009 CORRECTING ENTRY: The pdf for D.I. 2079 in 05-md-1717-JJF, D.I. 1694 in 05-cv-441-JJF, and D.I. 1714 in 05-cv-485-JJF have been replaced with amended versions per the Special Master's request. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
August 28, 2009 Filing 2080 PROPOSED ORDER Reducing the objection time from 20 to 5 days re (1714 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF, 2079 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1694 in 1:05-cv-00441-JJF) SPECIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master (DM 36) re Intel's Motion To Compel, and their Request For Production Of A Privilege Log. Signed by Special Master Vincent J. Poppiti on 8/28/2009 Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
August 28, 2009 Filing 2079 SPECIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master (DM 36) re Intel's Motion To Compel, and their Request For Production Of A Privilege Log. Signed by Special Master Vincent J. Poppiti on 8/28/2009. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms) (nms).
August 28, 2009 Filing 2078 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel of Michelle E. Whalen by AMD International Sales & Service LTD, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc. (Whalen, Michelle)
August 27, 2009 Filing 2077 SO ORDERED, re Stipulation And Order Regarding Filing Deadline For Intel's Motion(s) To Compel (see Stipulation for further details). Signed by Special Master Vincent J. Poppiti on 8/27/2009. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
August 27, 2009 Filing 2076 REDACTED VERSION of # 2049 Letter, by AMD International Sales & Service LTD, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Shandler, Chad)
August 26, 2009 REDACTION NOTICE: In accordance with section G of the Administrative Procedures Governing Filing and Service by Electronic Means, redacted versions of sealed documents shall be filed electronically within 5 business days of the filing of the sealed document. The records of this case do not reflect the filing of a redacted version of DI # 2049 . (nms)
August 26, 2009 Filing 2075 Letter to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti from J. Clayton Athey regarding Revised Reply Declaration of Dr. Keith Leffler - re # 2074 Exhibit to a Document, # 2073 Exhibit to a Document, # 2071 Exhibit to a Document, # 2072 Exhibit to a Document, # 2070 Exhibit to a Document, # 2069 Declaration. (Athey, J.)
August 26, 2009 Filing 2074 SEALED EXHIBIT re # 2070 Exhibit to a Document, # 2069 Declaration Tabs 149 - 178 to the Annex of Exhibits Cited in the Revised Reply Declaration of Dr. Keith Leffler by Phil Paul. (Athey, J.)
August 26, 2009 Filing 2073 SEALED EXHIBIT re # 2070 Exhibit to a Document, # 2069 Declaration Tabs 124 - 148 to the Annex of Exhibits Cited in the Revised Reply Declaration of Dr. Keith Leffler by Phil Paul. (Athey, J.)
August 26, 2009 Filing 2072 SEALED EXHIBIT re # 2070 Exhibit to a Document, # 2069 Declaration Tabs 107-123 to the Annex of Exhibits Cited in the Revised Reply Declaration of Dr. Keith Leffler by Phil Paul. (Athey, J.)
August 26, 2009 Filing 2071 SEALED EXHIBIT re # 2070 Exhibit to a Document, # 2069 Declaration Tabs 58-106 to the Annex of Exhibits Cited in the Revised Reply Declaration of Dr. Keith Leffler by Phil Paul. (Athey, J.)
August 26, 2009 Filing 2070 SEALED EXHIBIT re # 2069 Declaration Tabs 1 - 57 to the Annex of Exhibits Cited in the Revised Reply Declaration of Dr. Keith Leffler by Phil Paul. (Athey, J.)
August 26, 2009 Filing 2069 SEALED REVISED DECLARATION of Dr. Keith Leffler re # 916 MOTION to Certify Class (Original Declaration found at # 2020 ) by Phil Paul. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-F)(Athey, J.) Modified on 8/27/2009 (nms, ).
August 25, 2009 Filing 2068 REDACTED VERSION of (2048 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF) Letter to Vincent J. Poppiti by Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha, Intel Corporation. (Drane, W.)
August 19, 2009 Filing 2067 Letter to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti from W. Harding Drane, Jr. regarding enclosure letter from Donn Pickett to David Herron dated August 17, 2009, pursuant to the Court's 7/31/09 and 8/10/09 Orders (DM 35).. (Drane, W.)
August 19, 2009 Filing 2066 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Written Response of Advanced Micro Devices, Inc. and AMD International Sales & Service, Ltd. to Intel Corporation's Notice of Deposition Regarding Identification of Microprocessors Used By AMD, Pursuant To the Parties' Agreement by AMD International Sales & Service LTD, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc..(Cottrell, Frederick)
August 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 2065 SO ORDERED re (1684 in 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 2062 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1700 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF) PROPOSED ORDER reducing the objection time from 20 days to 5 days re (1699 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF, 1683 in 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 2061 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master Regarding Class Plaintiffs' Motion To Compel Deposition Testimony of AMD's Rule 30(B)(6) Witness On Certain Issues Raised By Plaintiffs' Pending Motion For Class Certification. Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 8/19/2009. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
August 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 2064 SEALED ORDER Granting (1685 in 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 2063 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1701 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF) Sealed Proposed Stipulation And Order With Respect To Certain Data Produced By Costco Wholesale Corporation. Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 8/19/2009. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
August 18, 2009 Filing 2063 SEALED PROPOSED Stipulation and Order With Respect To Certain Data Produced By Costco Wholesale Corporation. Signed by Special Master Vincent J. Poppiti on 8/18/2009. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
August 18, 2009 CORRECTING ENTRY: The pdf for D.I. 2061 in 05-md-1717-JJF, 1683 in 05-cv-441-JJF, and 1699 in 05-cv-485-JJF have been replaced with amended versions per the Special Master's request. The new version corrects the documents title. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
August 18, 2009 Filing 2062 PROPOSED ORDER reducing the objection time from 20 days to 5 days re (1699 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF, 1683 in 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 2061 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master Regarding Class Plaintiffs' Motion To Compel Deposition Testimony of AMD's Rule 30(B)(6) Witness On Certain Issues Raised By Plaintiffs' Pending Motion For Class Certification.. Signed by Special Master Vincent J. Poppiti on 8/18/2009. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
August 18, 2009 Filing 2061 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master Regarding Class Plaintiffs' Motion To Compel Deposition Testimony of AMD's Rule 30(B)(6) Witness On Certain Issues Raised By Plaintiffs' Pending Motion For Class Certification. Signed by Special Master Vincent J. Poppiti on 8/18/2009. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms) (nms).
August 17, 2009 Filing 2060 REDACTED VERSION of # 2057 Letter by AMD International Sales & Service LTD, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Shandler, Chad)
August 17, 2009 Filing 2059 NOTICE OF SERVICE of AMD's Response to Intel Corporation's and Intel Kabushiki Kaisha's 30(b)(6) Question No. 93 By Interrogatory by AMD International Sales & Service LTD, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc..(Cottrell, Frederick)
August 13, 2009 Filing 2058 NOTICE OF SERVICE of AMDs Written Response to Intel Corporations Notice of Deposition Regarding AMD Products by AMD International Sales & Service LTD, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc..(Shandler, Chad)
August 13, 2009 Filing 2057 SEALED Letter to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti from Chad M. Shandler regarding response to Intel's August 11, 2009 regarding Discovery of Glover Park (DM 36) - re # 2052 Letter. (Shandler, Chad)
August 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 2056 SO ORDERED re (2055 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1696 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF) PROPOSED Stipulation and Order Regarding Deadline To Depose Class Plaintiffs' Expert (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 8/13/2009. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
August 13, 2009 CORRECTING ENTRY: The pdf's for D.I. 1628 in 05-cv-441-JJF, and D.I. 1987 in 05-md-1717-JJF have been replaced with amended versions. The new version contains a cover page for the document identifying the case caption and document title. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF(nms)
August 12, 2009 Filing 2055 PROPOSED Stipulation and Order Regarding Deadline To Depose Class Plaintiffs' Expert (see Order for further details). Signed by Special Master Vincent J. Poppiti on 8/12/2009. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
August 12, 2009 Filing 2054 NOTICE OF SERVICE of AMD's Written Response to Intel Corporation's Notice of Deposition Regarding Non-Commercial Aircraft Usage Pursuant to the Parties' Agreement by AMD International Sales & Service LTD, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc..(Cottrell, Frederick)
August 12, 2009 Filing 2053 Letter to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti from David E. Moore regarding Intel's Motion to Compel AMD's testimony (DM 13b). (Drane, W.)
August 11, 2009 Filing 2052 Letter to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti with Exhibits A&B attached from David E. Moore regarding Intel's Discovery of Glover Park (DM 36). (Moore, David)
August 10, 2009 Filing 2051 SECOND Partial Amending REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of the Special Master Modifying the July 31, 2009 Report and Recommendation on AMD's Motion To Compel (DM 35). Signed by Special Master Vincent J. Poppiti on 8/10/2009. (nms)
August 7, 2009 Filing 2050 Letter to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti from J. Clayton Athey regarding response to Special Master's request of July 31, 2009 regarding the European Commission's July 14, 2009 letter. (Athey, J.)
August 7, 2009 Filing 2049 SEALED Letter to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti, Special Master from Chad M. Shandler regarding regarding response to Special Master's request of July 31, 2009 regarding the European Commission's July 14, 2009 response (DM 26 and 27). (Shandler, Chad)
August 7, 2009 Filing 2048 SEALED Letter to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti from David E. Moore regarding response to Special Master's request of July 31, 2009 regarding the European Commission's July 14, 2009 response. (Moore, David)
August 7, 2009 Filing 2047 NOTICE OF SERVICE of AMD's Supplemental Responses to Intel Corporation's and Intel Kabushiki Kaisha's First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiffs Advanced Micro Devices, Inc. and AMD International Sales & Service, Ltd. by AMD International Sales & Service LTD, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc..(Cottrell, Frederick)
August 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 2046 ORDER Withdrawing Request For International Judicial Assistance (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 8/5/2009. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
August 5, 2009 Filing 2045 AMENDED REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master Modifying the July 31, 2009 Report and Recommendation On AMD'S Motion To Compel (DM35)(see original Report and Recommendation found at: #2038 in 05-md-1717-JJF, #1662 in 05-cv-441-JJF, and #1684 in 05-cv-485-JJF). Signed by Vincent J. Poppiti on 8/5/2009. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
August 5, 2009 CORRECTING ENTRY: The pdfs for: #1666 in 05-cv-441-JJF, #1688 in 05-cv-485-JJF, and #2042 in 05-md-1717-JJF have been replaced with amended versions per counsel's request. The formatting of the document has been changed. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
August 4, 2009 Filing 2044 Letter to the Court, dated 8/4/2009, from Special Master Vincent J. Poppiti, enclosing a proposed order withdrawing the request for International Judicial Assistance. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(nms)
August 4, 2009 Filing 2043 INITIAL DISCLOSURES pursuant to Rule 26 by AMD International Sales & Service LTD, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc..(Shandler, Chad)
August 4, 2009 Filing 2042 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs Expert Reports for (i) B. Douglas Bernheim, Ph.D.; (ii) Nathan A. Brookwood; (iii) Thomas P. Conte, Ph.D.; (iv) Robert B.K. Dewar, Ph.D.; (v) Thomas Z. Lys, Ph.D.; (vi) Stephen C. Martson; (vii) Daryl Ostrander, Ph.D.; and (viii) Mark W. Watson, Ph.D. by AMD International Sales & Service LTD, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc..(Shandler, Chad) (nms).
August 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 2041 SO ORDER re (2039 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1663 in 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1685 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF) Proposed ORDER Reducing the Objection Time re (1684 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF, 2038 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1662 in 1:05-cv-00441-JJF) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of the Special Master from 20 days to 5 days. Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 8/4/2009. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
August 4, 2009 CORRECTING ENTRY: The pdfs for: #2036 in 05-md-1717-JJF, #1660 in 05-cv-441-JJF, #1683 in 05-cv-485-JJF have been replaced with amended versions per the Special Master's request. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
August 3, 2009 Filing 2040 Letter to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti from Chad M. Shandler regarding DM 26. (Attachments: # 1 Enclosure)(Shandler, Chad)
July 31, 2009 Filing 2039 Proposed ORDER Reducing the Objection Time re (1684 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF, 2038 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1662 in 1:05-cv-00441-JJF) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of the Special Master from 20 days to 5 days. Signed by Special Master Vincent J. Poppiti on 7/31/2009. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
July 31, 2009 Filing 2038 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master re Motion to Compel regarding Rule 30(b)(6) and Document Requests related to evidence preservation and completeness of document production (see Report and Recommendation for further details). Signed by Special Master Vincent J. Poppiti on 7/31/2009. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
July 31, 2009 Filing 2037 SEALED Letter/Order, dated 7/31/2009, to Chad M. Shandler, Esq., Richard L. Horowitz, Esq., and James J. Holzman, Esq., from Special Master Vincent J. Poppiti, regarding DM26. (nms)
July 31, 2009 Filing 2035 Letter to Hon. Vincent J. Poppiti from J. Clayton Athey regarding Withdrawal of Class Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Tech Data - re (1609 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF, 1556 in 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1905 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF) Letter. (Athey, J.)
July 31, 2009 Filing 2034 Official Transcript of Teleconference held on 07-29-09 before Judge Vincent J. Poppiti. Court Reporter/Transcriber Renee Ewing. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER ( Redaction Request due 8/21/2009., Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/31/2009., Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/29/2009.). (lad)
July 30, 2009 Filing 2036 Letter to Special Master Vincent J. Poppiti, dated 7/14/2009, from Luis Romero Requena, Director General of the European Commission, regarding the March 30, 2009 correspondence relating to DM 26. (nms) (nms).
July 30, 2009 Filing 2033 REDACTED VERSION of # 2026 Exhibit to a Document, # 2018 Statement, # 2027 Exhibit to a Document, # 2016 Answering Brief in Opposition, # 2025 Exhibit to a Document, # 2024 Exhibit to a Document, # 2028 Exhibit to a Document, # 2017 Reply Brief Redacted Version of Exhibits in Support of Reply in Further Support of Class Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, Class Plaintiffs' Preliminary Trial Plan, and Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant Intel Corporation's Motion to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Keith Leffler by Phil Paul. (Holzman, James)
July 30, 2009 Filing 2032 REDACTED VERSION of # 2020 Reply Declaration of Dr. Keith Leffler by Phil Paul. (Holzman, James) Modified on 8/3/2009 (nms).
July 30, 2009 Filing 2031 REDACTED VERSION of # 2018 Class Plaintiffs' Preliminary Trial Plan by Phil Paul. (Holzman, James) Modified on 8/3/2009 (nms).
July 30, 2009 Filing 2030 REDACTED VERSION of # 2017 Reply Brief in Further Support of Class Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification by Phil Paul. (Holzman, James)
July 30, 2009 Filing 2029 REDACTED VERSION of # 2016 Answering Brief in Opposition, to Defendant Intel Corporation's Motion to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Keith Leffler by Phil Paul. (Holzman, James)
July 29, 2009 Filing 2028 SEALED EXHIBIT re # 2018 Statement, # 2016 Answering Brief in Opposition, # 2024 Exhibit to a Document, # 2017 Reply Brief EXHIBITS 222 TO 240 IN SUPPORT OF REPLY IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF CLASS PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION, CLASS PLAINTIFFS' PRELIMINARY TRIAL PLAN, AND MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT INTEL CORPORATION'S MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF DR. KEITH LEFFLER by Phil Paul. (Herbert, Laina)
July 29, 2009 Filing 2027 SEALED EXHIBIT re # 2018 Statement, # 2016 Answering Brief in Opposition, # 2024 Exhibit to a Document, # 2017 Reply Brief EXHIBITS 208 TO 221 IN SUPPORT OF REPLY IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF CLASS PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION, CLASS PLAINTIFFS' PRELIMINARY TRIAL PLAN, AND MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT INTEL CORPORATION'S MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF DR. KEITH LEFFLER by Phil Paul. (Herbert, Laina)
July 29, 2009 Filing 2026 SEALED EXHIBIT re # 2018 Statement, # 2016 Answering Brief in Opposition, # 2024 Exhibit to a Document, # 2017 Reply Brief EXHIBITS 167 TO 207 IN SUPPORT OF REPLY IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF CLASS PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION, CLASS PLAINTIFFS' PRELIMINARY TRIAL PLAN, AND MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT INTEL CORPORATION'S MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF DR. KEITH LEFFLER by Phil Paul. (Herbert, Laina)
July 29, 2009 Filing 2025 SEALED EXHIBIT re # 2018 Statement, # 2016 Answering Brief in Opposition, # 2024 Exhibit to a Document, # 2017 Reply Brief EXHIBITS 89 TO 166 IN SUPPORT OF REPLY IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF CLASS PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION, CLASS PLAINTIFFS' PRELIMINARY TRIAL PLAN, AND MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT INTEL CORPORATION'S MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF DR. KEITH LEFFLER by Phil Paul. (Herbert, Laina)
July 29, 2009 Filing 2024 SEALED EXHIBIT re # 2018 Statement, # 2016 Answering Brief in Opposition, # 2017 Reply Brief EXHIBITS 1 TO 88 IN SUPPORT OF REPLY IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF CLASS PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION, CLASS PLAINTIFFS' PRELIMINARY TRIAL PLAN, AND MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT INTEL CORPORATION'S MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF DR. KEITH LEFFLER by Phil Paul. (Herbert, Laina)
July 29, 2009 CORRECTING ENTRY: D.I. 2019 has been removed from the docket and will be re-filed by counsel. (nms)
July 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 2023 SO ORDERED re (1656 in 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1670 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF) Proposed Stipulation and Proposed Case Management Order #10. Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 7/27/2009. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
July 24, 2009 Filing 2022 Proposed Stipulation and Case Management Order #10. Signed by Special Master Vincent J. Poppiti on 7/24/2009. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
July 23, 2009 Filing 2020 SEALED DECLARATION of Dr. Keith Leffler re # 916 MOTION to Certify Class (Attachments: Exhibits A-E) by Phil Paul. (Athey, J.) Modified on 7/24/2009 (nms).
July 23, 2009 Filing 2018 SEALED STATEMENT Class Plaintiffs' Preliminary Trial Plan by Phil Paul. (Athey, J.)
July 23, 2009 Filing 2017 SEALED REPLY BRIEF re # 916 MOTION to Certify Class Reply in Further Support of Class Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification with Exhibit A attached filed by Phil Paul. (Athey, J.)
July 23, 2009 Filing 2016 SEALED ANSWERING BRIEF re # 1254 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Keith Leffler with Proposed Order and Certificate of Service (Attached: Exhibit A) filed by Phil Paul.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 8/3/2009. (Athey, J.) Modified on 7/24/2009 (nms).
July 23, 2009 Filing 2015 SO ORDERED re Order Regarding The Length And Scope of Intel's Further Deposition of AMD's 30(B)(6) Witnesses. Signed by Special Master Vincent J. Poppiti on 7/23/2009. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
July 23, 2009 Filing 2014 SO ORDERED re STIPULATION AND ORDER Regarding Briefing On Class Plaintiffs' Motion For Class Certification. Signed by Special Master Vincent J. Poppiti on 7/23/2009. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
July 22, 2009 Filing 2021 Letter to the Court, received 7/22/2009, from Concetta Melidona, re # 1745 Order and # 1746 Order. (nms)
July 22, 2009 Filing 2013 Official Transcript of Teleconference held on 07-20-09 before Judge Vincent J. Poppiti. Court Reporter/Transcriber Renee Ewing. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/12/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/24/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/20/2009. (lad)
July 22, 2009 Filing 2012 REDACTED VERSION of # 1996 Letter by AMD International Sales & Service LTD, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - C)(Cottrell, Frederick)
July 22, 2009 Filing 2011 AMENDED DOCUMENT by AMD International Sales & Service LTD, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. Amendment to # 1961 Declaration,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - H)(Cottrell, Frederick)
July 22, 2009 Filing 2010 REDACTED VERSION of (1632 in 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1650 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF, 1991 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF) Stipulation and [Proposed] Order With Respect To Certain Data Produced By Lenovo by Phil Paul. (Herbert, Laina)
July 21, 2009 Filing 2009 NOTICE of Intel's Notice of Subpoena to Ted Clark, pursuant to Rule 45 and Rule 30(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha, Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha (Drane, W.)
July 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 2008 STIPULATION and Order Regarding Class Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Tech Data re (1609 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF, 1556 in 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1905 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF) Letter by Phil Paul. (Athey, J.)
July 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 2007 SO ORDER re (2004 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1645 in 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1655 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF) SEALED PROPOSED Stipulation and Order With Respect to Certain Data Produced by Lenovo. Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 7/16/2009. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
July 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 2006 SO ORDERED re (1646 in 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 2005 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1656 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF) Sealed Proposed Stipulation and Order With Respect To Certain Data Produced By ACER. Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 7/16/2009. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
July 16, 2009 Filing 2005 SEALED PROPOSED Stipulation and Order With Respect To Certain Data Produced by Acer. Signed by Special Master Vincent J. Poppiti on 7/16/2009. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
July 16, 2009 CORRECTING ENTRY: The pdf's found at: D.I. 2004 in 05-md-1717-JJF; D.I. 1645 in 05-cv-441-JJFl; and D.I. 1655 in 05-cv-485-JJF have been replaced with sealed document pages as these filing were intended to be filed under seal. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
July 16, 2009 Filing 2004 SEALED PROPOSED Stipulation and Order With Respect to Certain Data Produced by Lenovo. Signed by Special Master Vincent J. Poppiti on 7/16/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms) (nms). Modified on 7/16/2009 (nms).
July 16, 2009 Filing 2003 SO ORDERED, re Stipulation And Order For Extension Of Page Limits (see Order for further details). Signed by Special Master Vincent J. Poppiti on 7/16/2009. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF(nms)
July 16, 2009 Filing 2002 Letter to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti from Chad M. Shandler regarding response to letter filed 7/15/09 - re # 1997 Letter. (Shandler, Chad)
July 16, 2009 Filing 2001 Letter to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti from W. Harding Drane, Jr. regarding in response to Adam Balick's letter of July 15, 2009. (Drane, W.)
July 16, 2009 Filing 2000 REDACTED VERSION of (1622 in 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1981 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF) Letter, to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti in response to AMD's opposition materials and in support of its request for in camera review of disputed documents. by Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha, Intel Corporation. (Drane, W.) (nms).
July 16, 2009 Filing 1999 REDACTED VERSION of (1984 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1625 in 1:05-cv-00441-JJF) Letter, to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti by Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha, Intel Corporation. (Drane, W.)
July 16, 2009 Filing 1998 PROPOSED Amended STIPULATION and Order Modifying CMO No. 3 Regarding Exchange of Documents Considered by Experts. Signed by Special Master Vincent J. Poppiti on 7/16/2009. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
July 15, 2009 Filing 1997 Letter to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti from Frederick L. Cottrell, III regarding joint report pursuant to Amended Case Management Order No. 6 - re # 1018 Order. (Cottrell, Frederick)
July 15, 2009 Filing 1996 SEALED Letter to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti from Frederick L. Cottrell, III regarding additional deposition hours. (Cottrell, Frederick)
July 15, 2009 Filing 1995 DECLARATION re (1635 in 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1994 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF) Letter Declaration of Donn P. Pickett in Support of Intel's Letter Brief Regarding The Appropriate Scope and Duration of Further Depositions Ordered June 22, 2009 by Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha, Intel Corporation. (Drane, W.)
July 15, 2009 Filing 1994 Letter to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti from W. Harding Drane, Jr. regarding Intel's upcoming Court Ordered Depositions. (Drane, W.)
July 15, 2009 Filing 1993 REDACTED VERSION of # 1983 Declaration by AMD International Sales & Service LTD, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - C)(Cottrell, Frederick)
July 15, 2009 Filing 1992 REDACTED VERSION of # 1982 Letter by AMD International Sales & Service LTD, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Cottrell, Frederick)
July 15, 2009 Filing 1991 SEALED STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order With Respect to Certain Data Produced by Lenovo by Phil Paul. (Herbert, Laina)
July 15, 2009 Filing 1990 Letter to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti from Adam Balick, Esquire. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order regarding Hewlett-Packard third Party Depositions and AMD Expert Reports)(Balick, Adam)
July 15, 2009 Filing 1989 REDACTED VERSION of (1621 in 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1980 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1646 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF) Stipulation and [Proposed] Order With Respect To Certain Data Produced by ACER by Phil Paul. (Herbert, Laina)
July 14, 2009 Filing 1988 Letter to Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti from Chad M. Shandler regarding Discovery Matters 26 and 27 - re # 1657 Letter,. (Shandler, Chad)
July 13, 2009 Filing 1987 REDACTED VERSION of (1607 in 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1959 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF) Declaration, of Donn P. Pickett, volume 2 by Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha, Intel Corporation. (Drane, W.) (nms).
July 13, 2009 Filing 1986 REDACTED VERSION of (1958 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1606 in 1:05-cv-00441-JJF) Declaration, by Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha, Intel Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Volume 1 redacted exhibits 1-10)(Drane, W.)
July 13, 2009 Filing 1985 REDACTED VERSION of (1879 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1532 in 1:05-cv-00441-JJF) Letter to the Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti by Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha, Intel Corporation. (Drane, W.)
July 10, 2009 Filing 1984 SEALED Letter to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti from W. Harding Drane, Jr. regarding reply to AMD's opposition materials and in support of its Motion to Compel Discovery from Glover Park Group, scheduled for hearing on July 20, 2009. (Drane, W.)
July 10, 2009 Filing 1983 SEALED DECLARATION of David L. Herron re # 1982 Letter by AMD International Sales & Service LTD, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Cottrell, Frederick) Modified on 7/13/2009 (nms).
July 10, 2009 Filing 1982 SEALED Letter to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti from Frederick L. Cottrell, III regarding Rule 30(b)(6) discovery. (Cottrell, Frederick)
July 10, 2009 Filing 1981 SEALED Letter to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti from W. Harding Drane, Jr. regarding reply to AMD's opposition materials and in support of its request for in camera review of disputed document, scheduled for hearing on July 20, 2009. (Drane, W.)
July 10, 2009 REDACTION NOTICE: In accordance with section G of the Administrative Procedures Governing Filing and Service by Electronic Means, redacted versions of sealed documents shall be filed electronically within 5 business days of the filing of the sealed document. The records of this case do not reflect the filing of redacted versions of DI # 1958 and # 1959 . (nms)
July 9, 2009 Filing 1980 SEALED STIPULATION and Proposed Order With Respect To Certain Data Produced By ACER by Phil Paul. (Herbert, Laina) Modified on 7/10/2009 (nms).
July 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1979 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for (1581 in 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1933 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master re DM-4 di.3 on the Motion of Defendants Intel Corporation and Intel Kabushiki Kaisha to Compel further testimony. Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 7/7/2009. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF(nms)
July 6, 2009 Filing 1978 REDACTED VERSION of # 1948 Letter, by AMD International Sales & Service LTD, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Cottrell, Frederick)
July 6, 2009 Filing 1977 REDACTED VERSION of # 1952 Declaration, by AMD International Sales & Service LTD, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Cottrell, Frederick)
July 6, 2009 Filing 1976 REDACTED VERSION of # 1949 Declaration, by AMD International Sales & Service LTD, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Cottrell, Frederick)
July 6, 2009 Filing 1975 REDACTED VERSION of # 1950 Declaration, by AMD International Sales & Service LTD, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Cottrell, Frederick)
July 6, 2009 Filing 1974 REDACTED VERSION of # 1951 Declaration, by AMD International Sales & Service LTD, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Cottrell, Frederick)
July 6, 2009 Filing 1973 REDACTED VERSION of (1643 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF) Letter, (1967 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF) Letter to the Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti with Exhibit A regarding obtaining AMD testimony on issues raised by the class plaintiffs' pending motion for class certification. by Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha. (Drane, W.)
July 6, 2009 Filing 1972 REDACTED VERSION of # 1956 Declaration, by AMD International Sales & Service LTD, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Cottrell, Frederick) (nms).
July 6, 2009 Filing 1971 REDACTED VERSION of # 1955 Declaration, by AMD International Sales & Service LTD, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Cottrell, Frederick) (nms).
July 6, 2009 Filing 1970 REDACTED VERSION of # 1954 Declaration, by AMD International Sales & Service LTD, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Cottrell, Frederick) (nms).
July 6, 2009 Filing 1969 REDACTED VERSION of # 1953 Letter, by AMD International Sales & Service LTD, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Cottrell, Frederick) (nms).
July 6, 2009 Filing 1968 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel Roy M. Bell and Jason S. Hartley of Troutman Sanders LLP as Attorneys for Plaintiff Gabriela Herroeder-Perras by Phil Paul (Athey, J.)
July 2, 2009 Filing 1967 SEALED Letter to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti from W. Harding Drane, Jr. regarding obtaining AMD testimony on issues raised by the class plaintiffs' pending motion for class certification.. (Drane, W.)
June 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1966 SO ORDERED re (1592 in 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1944 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1635 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF) Proposed Stipulation and Order Regarding The Production Of Dell Transactional Data. Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 6/30/2009. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
June 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1965 SO ORDERED re (1963 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1639 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF) Proposed Stipulation and Order Regarding Class Certification Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 6/30/2009. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
June 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1964 ORDER directing the parties to advise the Special Master by 7/15/2009 with regard to the meet and confer discussions that were held regarding additional Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) time needed. Signed by Special Master Vincent J. Poppiti on 6/30/2009. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
June 29, 2009 Filing 1962 SO ORDER re (1947 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1595 in 1:05-cv-00441-JJF ) Stipulation and Order For Extension of Page Limits filed by AMD International Sales & Service LTD, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.,. Signed by Special Master Vincent J. Poppiti on 6/29/2009. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF(nms)
June 29, 2009 Filing 1961 DECLARATION re # 1960 Letter Declaration of Michael M. Maddigan in Support of AMD's Opposition to Intel's Motion to Compel by AMD International Sales & Service LTD, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-B, # 2 Exhibit C-H)(Fineman, Steven)
June 29, 2009 Filing 1960 Letter to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti from Frederick L. Cottrell, III regarding Reply to Intels June 22 letter brief - re # 1928 Letter. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A and B)(Fineman, Steven)
June 26, 2009 Filing 1959 SEALED DECLARATION re (1957 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1605 in 1:05-cv-00441-JJF) Letter Volume 2 of Sealed Declaration of Donn P. Pickett in Support of Intel's Opposition to AMD's Motion to Compel Re 30(b)(6) Notice and Document Requests with Certificate of Service by Intel Kabushiki Kaisha, Intel Corporation. (Drane, W.) (nms).
June 26, 2009 Filing 1958 SEALED DECLARATION re (1957 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1605 in 1:05-cv-00441-JJF) Letter Sealed Declaration of Donn P. Pickett in Support of Intel's Opposition to AMD's Motion to Compel Re 30(b)(6) Notice and Document Requests, Volume I, with Certificate of Service by Intel Kabushiki Kaisha, Intel Corporation. (Drane, W.) (nms).
June 26, 2009 Filing 1957 Letter to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti from W. Harding Drane, Jr. regarding Opposition to AMD's Motion to Compel filed on June 12, 2009. (Drane, W.)
June 26, 2009 Filing 1956 SEALED DECLARATION re (1601 in 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1953 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF) Letter, of Hector De J. Ruiz, Ph.D. in Support of AMD's Response to Intel's Request for In Camera Review of Disputed Document by Advanced Micro Devices, Inc., AMD International Sales & Service LTD, AMD International Sales & Service LTD, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Cottrell, Frederick)
June 26, 2009 Filing 1955 SEALED DECLARATION re (1601 in 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1953 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF) Letter, of Mark A. Samuels in Support of AMD's Response to Intel's Request for In Camera Review of Disputed Document by Advanced Micro Devices, Inc., AMD International Sales & Service LTD, AMD International Sales & Service LTD, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Cottrell, Frederick)
June 26, 2009 Filing 1954 SEALED DECLARATION re (1601 in 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1953 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF) Letter, of Sara T. Brand, Ph.D. in Support of AMD's Response to Intel's Request for In Camera Review of Disputed Document by Advanced Micro Devices, Inc., AMD International Sales & Service LTD, AMD International Sales & Service LTD, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Cottrell, Frederick)
June 26, 2009 Filing 1953 SEALED Letter to Special Master Vincent J. Poppiti from Frederick L. Cottrell, III regarding AMD's response to Intel's Request for In Camera Review of Disputed Document - re (1545 in 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1892 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF) Letter. (Cottrell, Frederick)
June 26, 2009 Filing 1952 SEALED DECLARATION re (1596 in 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1948 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF) Letter, of Charles P. Diamond in Support of AMD's Opposition to Intel's Motion to Compel Discovery from Third-Party Glover Park Group by Advanced Micro Devices, Inc., AMD International Sales & Service LTD, AMD International Sales & Service LTD, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Cottrell, Frederick)
June 26, 2009 Filing 1951 SEALED DECLARATION re (1596 in 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1948 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF) Letter, of Roberta H. Vespremi in Support of AMD's Opposition to Intel's Motion to Compel Discovery from Third-Party Glover Park Group by Advanced Micro Devices, Inc., AMD International Sales & Service LTD, AMD International Sales & Service LTD, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Cottrell, Frederick)
June 26, 2009 Filing 1950 SEALED DECLARATION re (1596 in 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1948 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF) Letter, of Thomas M. McCoy in Support of AMD's Opposition to Intel's Motion to Compel Discovery from Third-Party Glover Park Group by Advanced Micro Devices, Inc., AMD International Sales & Service LTD, AMD International Sales & Service LTD, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Cottrell, Frederick)
June 26, 2009 Filing 1949 SEALED DECLARATION re (1596 in 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1948 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF) Letter, of Jonathan B. Sallet in Support of AMD's Opposition to Intel's Motion to Compel Discovery from Third-Party Glover Park Group by Advanced Micro Devices, Inc., AMD International Sales & Service LTD, AMD International Sales & Service LTD, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Cottrell, Frederick)
June 26, 2009 Filing 1948 SEALED Letter to Special Master Vincent J. Poppiti from Frederick L. Cottrell, III regarding AMD's response to Intel's Motion to Compel Glover Park subpoena - re (1552 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF) Letter, (1901 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF) Letter. (Cottrell, Frederick)
June 26, 2009 Filing 1947 STIPULATION for Extension of Page Limits by AMD International Sales & Service LTD, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Cottrell, Frederick)
June 26, 2009 Filing 1946 Official Transcript of Teleconference held on 06-23-09 before Judge Vincent J. Poppiti. Court Reporter/Transcriber Susan M. Migatz. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER ( Redaction Request due 7/17/2009., Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/27/2009., Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/24/2009.). (lad)
June 26, 2009 Filing 1945 REDACTED VERSION of (1574 in 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1624 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF, 1924 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF) Letter, to the Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti from J. Clayton Athey regarding Class Plaintiffs' Reply in Further Support of Motion to Compel Dell by Phil Paul. (Attachments: # 1 Redacted Exhibit A, # 2 Redacted Exhibits 13-14)(Athey, J.)
June 25, 2009 Filing 1963 PROPOSED Stipulation and Order Regarding Class Certification Briefing Schedule (see Order for further details). Signed by Special Master Vincent J. Poppiti on 6/25/2009. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
June 25, 2009 Filing 1944 PROPOSED Stipulation and Order Regarding The Production Of Dell Transactional Data. Signed by Special Master Vincent J. Poppiti on 6/25/2009. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
June 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1943 MEMORANDUM ORDER DENYING (1785 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1442 in 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1529 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF) MOTION Pursuant To Rules 16 And 56, For A Pretrial Conference To Seek The Court's Determination Of Key Issues Of Law That Will Govern Completion Of Preparation And Trial filed by Intel Kabushiki Kaisha, Intel Corporation. Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 6/25/2009. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
June 25, 2009 Filing 1942 SO OREDERED re Stipulation and Order Regarding Class Plaintiffs' Motion To Compel Tech Data (see Order for further details). Signed by Special Master Vincent J. Poppiti on 6/25/2009. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
June 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1941 STIPULATION And Order Regarding The Production Of Dell Transactional Data re (1603 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF, 1548 in 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1895 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF) Letter by Phil Paul. (Athey, J.)
June 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1940 STIPULATION and Order Regarding Class Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Tech Data re (1609 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF, 1556 in 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1905 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF) Letter by Phil Paul. (Athey, J.)
June 25, 2009 Filing 1939 REDACTED VERSION of (1916 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1619 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF, 1566 in 1:05-cv-00441-JJF) Letter to Special Master Vincent J. Poppiti from Lauren E. Maguire on behalf of Dell regarding response to Motion to Compel Dell to Produce Transactional Data by Dell Inc.. (Maguire, Lauren)
June 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1938 SO ORDERED re (1584 in 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1936 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1628 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF) PROPOSED Stipulation and Order Regarding Admissibility Of Intel And AMD Data (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 6/24/2009. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
June 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1937 SO ORDERED re (1582 in 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1934 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF) PROPOSED ORDER reducing the Objection time from that of no later than 20 days to no later than 5 days re (1581 in 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1933 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master re DM-4 di.3 on the Motion of Defendants Inte l Corporation and Intel Kabushiki Kaisha to Compel further testimony. Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 6/23/2009. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF(nms)
June 23, 2009 Filing 1936 PROPOSED Stipulation and Order Regarding Admissibility Of Intel And AMD Data (see Order for further details). Signed by Special Master Vincent J. Poppiti on 6/23/2009. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms) Modified on 6/24/2009 (nms).
June 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1935 ORDER Granting Stipulation and Order For Extension Of Time re (1552 in 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1901 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF) Motion to Compel Glover Park Subpoena, and (1545 in 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1892 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF) Request for In Camera Review of Disputed Document. Signed by Special Master Vincen J. Poppiti on 6/22/2009. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF(nms)
June 22, 2009 Filing 1934 PROPOSED ORDER reducing the Objection time from that of no later than 20 days to no later than 5 days re (1581 in 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1933 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master re DM-4 di.3 on the Motion of Defendants Intel Corporation and Intel Kabushiki Kaisha to Compel further testimony. Signed by Special Master Vincent J. Poppiti on 6/22/2009. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF(nms)
June 22, 2009 Filing 1933 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master re DM-4 di.3 on the Motion of Defendants Intel Corporation and Intel Kabushiki Kaisha to Compel further testimony. Signed by Special Master Vincent J. Poppiti on 6/22/2009. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF(nms) Modified on 6/23/2009 (nms).
June 22, 2009 Filing 1932 REDACTED VERSION of (1547 in 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1894 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF) Declaration of Donn P Pickett in Support of Intel's REquest for In Camera Review of Disputed Document with Exhibits A-H2 by Intel Kabushiki Kaisha, Intel Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Redacted Exhibits A-F, # 2 Exhibit Redacted Exhibits G, # 3 Exhibit Redacted Exhibit H-1, # 4 Exhibit Redacted Exhibit H-2)(Drane, W.) (nms).
June 22, 2009 Filing 1931 REDACTED VERSION of (1546 in 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1893 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF) Declaration of Sarretta McDonough In Support of Intel's Request for In Camera Review of Disputed Document with Exhibits A-C by Intel Kabushiki Kaisha, Intel Corporation. (Drane, W.) (nms).
June 22, 2009 Filing 1930 REDACTED VERSION of (1545 in 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1892 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF) Letter to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti by Intel Kabushiki Kaisha, Intel Corporation. (Drane, W.) (nms).
June 22, 2009 REDACTION NOTICE: In accordance with section G of the Administrative Procedures Governing Filing and Service by Electronic Means, redacted versions of sealed documents shall be filed electronically within 5 business days of the filing of the sealed document. The records of this case do not reflect the filing of a redacted version of DI # 1879 . (nms)
June 22, 2009 Filing 1929 DECLARATION re (1626 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF, 1928 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF) Letter Declaration of David M. Balabanian in Support of Defendant Intel Corporation's Letter Brief to Compel the 30(b)(6) Deposition of AMD with Exhibits A-E and Certificate of Service by Intel Kabushiki Kaisha, Intel Corporation. (Drane, W.)
June 22, 2009 REDACTION NOTICE: In accordance with section G of the Administrative Procedures Governing Filing and Service by Electronic Means, redacted versions of sealed documents shall be filed electronically within 5 business days of the filing of the sealed document. The records of this case do not reflect the filing of redacted versions of DI # 1892 , # 1893 , and # 1894 . (nms)
June 22, 2009 Filing 1928 Letter to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti from W. Harding Drane, Jr. regarding obtaining AMD testimony on issues raised by the class plaintiffs' pending motion for class certification. (Drane, W.)
June 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1927 ORDER Granting Stipulation And Order For Extension Of Time to allow third-party Tech Data Corporation to file a response to Class Plaintiffs' Motion To Compel to June 26, 2009. Class Plaintiffs' Reply will be due by July 1, 2009. Signed by Special Master Vincent J. Poppiti on 6/19/2009. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
June 19, 2009 Filing 1926 REDACTED VERSION of # 1902 Declaration, PUBLIC VERSION OF DECLARATION O F DONN P. PICKETT IN SUPPORT OF INTEL'S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY FRM THIRD PARTY GLOVER PARK GROUP by Intel Corporation. (Horwitz, Richard)
June 19, 2009 Filing 1925 REDACTED VERSION of # 1901 Letter PUBLIC VERSION OF LETTER TO THE HONORABLE VINCENT J. POPPITI DATED JUNE 12, 2009 by Intel Corporation. (Horwitz, Richard)
June 19, 2009 Filing 1924 SEALED Letter to Hon. Vincent J. Poppiti from J. Clayton Athey regarding Class Plaintiffs' Reply in Further Support of Motion to Compel Dell - re (1603 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF, 1548 in 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1895 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF) Letter. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit 13-14)(Athey, J.)
June 19, 2009 Filing 1923 REDACTED VERSION of # 1904 Declaration by AMD International Sales & Service LTD, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - L)(Cottrell, Frederick)
June 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1922 STIPULATION and Order for Extension of Time re (1609 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF, 1556 in 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1905 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF) Letter by Phil Paul. (Athey, J.)
June 19, 2009 Filing 1921 REDACTED VERSION of # 1903 Letter by AMD International Sales & Service LTD, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment)(Cottrell, Frederick)
June 19, 2009 Filing 1920 Amended NOTICE of Subpoena and Deposition of Richard Walker on July 2, 2009 at 9:00 a.m. by Phil Paul (Attachments: # 1 Subpoena of Richard Walker)(Herbert, Laina)
June 18, 2009 Filing 1919 Second Amended NOTICE of Subpoena and Deposition of Richard Walker on July 2, 2009, beginning at 9:00 a.m. by AMD International Sales & Service LTD, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Subpoena, # 2 certificate of service)(Cottrell, Frederick) Modified on 6/19/2009 (nms).
June 18, 2009 Filing 1918 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Amended Second Supplemental Response of Plaintiffs Advanced Micro Devices, Inc. and AMD International Sales & Service, Ltd. to Intel Corporations and Intel Kabushiki Kaishas Second Set of Interrogatories by AMD International Sales & Service LTD, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc..(Cottrell, Frederick)
June 18, 2009 Filing 1917 REDACTED VERSION of (1603 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF, 1548 in 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1895 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF) Letter to The Hon. Vincent J. Poppiti from J. Clayton Athey regarding Motion to Compel Dell Corporation to Produce Transactional Data by Phil Paul. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibits 1-12)(Athey, J.)
June 18, 2009 Filing 1916 SEALED Letter to Special Master Vincent J. Poppiti from Lauren E. Maguire on behalf of Dell regarding response to Motion to Compel Dell to Produce Transactional Data. (Maguire, Lauren)
June 17, 2009 Filing 1915 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Second Supplemental Response of Plaintiffs Advanced Micro Devices, Inc. and AMD International Sales & Service, Ltd. to Intel Corporation's and Intel Kabushiki Kaisha's Second Set of Interrogatories re # 1334 Notice of Service, by AMD International Sales & Service LTD, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. Related document: # 1334 Notice of Service, filed by AMD International Sales & Service LTD, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc..(Cottrell, Frederick)
June 17, 2009 Filing 1914 Amended NOTICE of Deposition of Staples, Inc. on June 18, 2009 at 9:00 a.m. by Phil Paul (Attachments: # 1 Subpoena of Staples, Inc.)(Herbert, Laina)
June 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1913 SO ORDERED re (1613 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF, 1909 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1559 in 1:05-cv-00441-JJF) PROPOSED Stipulation and ORDER With Respect To The Finalization Of Discovery Of Ingram Micro, Acer, Hewlett Packard, Lenovo, and Dell. Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 6/16/2009. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
June 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1912 SO ORDERED re (1612 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF, 1908 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1558 in 1:05-cv-00441-JJF) Proposed Stipulation and Case Management Order No. 9 (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 6/16/2009. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
June 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1911 SO ORDERED re (1910 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1560 in 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1614 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF) Proposed Stipulation and Order With Respect To Certain Discovery Issues (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 6/16/2009. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
June 16, 2009 Filing 1910 PROPOSED Stipulation And Order With Respect To Certain Discovery Issues (see Order for further details). Signed by Special Master Vincent J. Poppiti on 6/16/2009. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
June 15, 2009 Filing 1909 PROPOSED Stipulation and ORDER With Respect To The Finalization Of Discovery Of Ingram Micro, Acer, Hewlett Packard, Lenovo, and Dell. Signed by Special Master Vincent J. Poppiti on 6/15/2009. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
June 15, 2009 Filing 1908 PROPOSED Stipulation and Case Management Order No. 9. Signed by Special Master Vincent J. Poppiti on 6/15/2009. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
June 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1907 SO ORDERED re (1607 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF, 1899 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF) PROPOSED Stipulation and ORDER With Respect To Depostitions Of Office Depot, Inc., Staples, Inc., Keith Lefebvre and Nec Corporation of America. Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 6/12/2009. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
June 12, 2009 Filing 1906 STIPULATION and Proposed ORDER Regarding The Finalization Of Discovery Of Ingram Micro, Acer, Hewlett Packard, Lenovo, And Dell by Phil Paul. (Athey, J.)
June 12, 2009 Filing 1905 Letter to Hon. Vincent J. Poppiti from J. Clayton Athey regarding Class Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Tech Data. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Athey, J.)
June 12, 2009 Filing 1904 SEALED DECLARATION re # 1903 Letter (Declaration of Jeffrey J. Fowler) by AMD International Sales & Service LTD, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Cottrell, Frederick)
June 12, 2009 Filing 1903 SEALED Letter to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti from Frederick L. Cottrell, III regarding compel the Rule 30(b)(6) deposition requested and Intel's responses to AMD's document requests. (Cottrell, Frederick)
June 12, 2009 Filing 1902 SEALED DECLARATION of Donn P. Pickett in Support of Intel's Motion to Compel Discovery From Third-Party Glover Park Group with Exhibits A-R with Certificate of Service by Intel Kabushiki Kaisha, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc., Intel Corporation. (Horwitz, Richard)
June 12, 2009 Filing 1901 SEALED Letter to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti from Richard L. Horwitz regarding requesting the Court to issue Order compelling documents and testimony from Glover Park Group, AMD's public relations consultant. (Horwitz, Richard)
June 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1900 STIPULATION And ORDER Regarding Depositions (See Order for further details). Signed by Special Master Vincent J. Poppiti on 6/12/2009. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
June 12, 2009 Filing 1899 PROPOSED Stipulation and ORDER With Respect To Depostitions Of Office Depot, Inc., Staples, Inc., Keith Lefebvre and Nec Corporation of America. Signed by Special Master Vincent J. Poppiti on 6/12/2009. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
June 12, 2009 Filing 1898 STIPULATION re: Depositions by AMD International Sales & Service LTD, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Cottrell, Frederick)
June 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1897 ORDER Regarding Hewlett-Packard Third Party Depositions. The depositions of Carly Fiorina, Scott Stallard, Richard Walker, and Ted Clark may be taken as expeditiously as reasonably possible after the June 12, 2009, discovery cut off date, at a time and place convenient to HP and the parties. Signed by Special Master Vincent J. Poppiti on 6/11/2009. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
June 11, 2009 Filing 1896 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order With Respect To Depositions Of Office Depot, Inc., Staples, Inc., Keith Lefebvre And NEC Corporation Of America by Phil Paul. (Athey, J.)
June 11, 2009 Filing 1895 SEALED Letter to the Hon. Vincent J. Poppiti from J. Clayton Athey regarding Motion to Compel Dell Corporation to Produce Transactional Data. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibits 1-12)(Athey, J.) Modified on 6/12/2009 (nms).
June 11, 2009 Filing 1894 SEALED DECLARATION of Donn P. Pickett in Support of Intel's Request for In Camera Review of Disputed Document by Intel Kabushiki Kaisha, Intel Corporation. (Horwitz, Richard)
June 11, 2009 Filing 1893 SEALED DECLARATION of Sarretta McDonough in Support of Intel's Request for In Camera Review of Disputed Document with Exhibits A-C by Intel Kabushiki Kaisha, Intel Corporation. (Horwitz, Richard)
June 11, 2009 Filing 1892 SEALED Letter to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti from Richard L. Horwitz regarding Letter Motion requesting in camera review of disputed document and to compel after in camera review. (Horwitz, Richard)
June 11, 2009 Filing 1891 NOTICE OF SERVICE of AMD's Respones to Intel Corporation's and Intel Kabushiki Kaisha's Supplement to the First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiffs Advanced Micro Devices, Inc. and AMD International Sales & Service, Ltd. by Advanced Micro Devices, Inc., AMD International Sales & Service LTD, AMD International Sales & Service LTD, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc..(Fineman, Steven)
June 11, 2009 Filing 1890 NOTICE OF SERVICE of AMD's Responses to Intel Corporation's and Intel Kabushiki Kaisha's Third Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiffs Advanced Micro Devices, Inc. and AMD International Sales & Service, Ltd. re (1448 in 1:05-cv-00441-JJF) Notice of Service, (1791 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF) Notice of Service, by Advanced Micro Devices, Inc., AMD International Sales & Service LTD, AMD International Sales & Service LTD, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. Related document: (1448 in 1:05-cv-00441-JJF) Notice of Service, filed by Intel Kabushiki Kaisha, Intel Corporation, (1791 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF) Notice of Service, filed by Intel Kabushiki Kaisha, Intel Corporation.(Fineman, Steven)
June 10, 2009 Filing 1889 Amended Notice of Subpoena Ad Testificandum directed to Staples, Inc., pursuant to Rule 45 and Rule 30(b)(6) by Intel Kabushiki Kaisha, Intel Corporation (Drane, W.) Modified on 6/11/2009 (nms).
June 10, 2009 Filing 1888 Amended Notice of Subpoena Ad Testificandum directed to Office Depot, pursuant to Rule 45 and 30(b)(6) by Intel Kabushiki Kaisha, Intel Corporation (Drane, W.) Modified on 6/11/2009 (nms).
June 10, 2009 Filing 1887 Letter to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti from Adam Balick, Esquire. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order of Letter to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti)(Balick, Adam)
June 10, 2009 Filing 1886 REDACTED VERSION of (1871 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1524 in 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1593 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF) Stipulation and [Proposed] Order With Respect To Certain Data Produced By Toshiba America Information Systems ("TAIS") by Phil Paul. (Herbert, Laina)
June 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1885 SO ORDERED re (1880 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1533 in 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1594 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF) PROPOSED ORDER re (1871 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1524 in 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1593 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF) Stipulation and Order With Respect To Certain Data Produced By Toshiba America Information Systems ("TAIS"). Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 6/9/2009. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
June 9, 2009 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (1881 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1534 in 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1595 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Nicholas J. Little of Howrey LLP filed by Intel Kabushiki Kaisha, Intel Corporation. Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 6/9/2009. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
June 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1884 ORDER Striking Sur-Reply Letter Brief (see Order for further details). Signed by Special Master Vincent J. Poppiti on 6/9/2009. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
June 9, 2009 Filing 1883 Amended NOTICE of of Deposition of Tech Data Corporation on June 12, 2009 at 12:30 p.m. by Phil Paul (Attachments: # 1 Subpoena of Tech Data Corporation)(Herbert, Laina)
June 9, 2009 Filing 1882 Amended NOTICE of Subpoena and Deposition of Richard Walker on June 16, 2009 at 9:00 a.m. by AMD International Sales & Service LTD, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc. re # 1864 Notice (Other) (Fineman, Steven)
June 8, 2009 Filing 1881 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Nicholas J. Little of Howrey LLP - filed by Intel Kabushiki Kaisha, Intel Corporation. (Drane, W.)
June 8, 2009 Filing 1880 PROPOSED ORDER re (1871 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1524 in 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1593 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF) Stipulation and Order With Respect To Certain Data Produced By Toshiba America Information Systems ("TAIS") and filed by Phil Paul. Signed by Special Master Vicent J. Poppiti on 6/8/2009. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
June 5, 2009 Filing 1879 SEALED Letter to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti from W. Harding Drane, Jr. regarding AMD's letter brief of 5/27/09. (Drane, W.)
June 5, 2009 Filing 1878 REDACTED VERSION of # 1816 Letter to the Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti by Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha. (Drane, W.) Modified on 6/8/2009 (nms).
June 5, 2009 Filing 1877 REDACTED VERSION of # 1833 Letter to Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti by Intel Kabushiki Kaisha, Intel Corporation. (Horwitz, Richard) Modified on 6/8/2009 (nms).
June 5, 2009 Filing 1876 REDACTED VERSION of # 1838 Letter, by AMD International Sales & Service LTD, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Cottrell, Frederick)
June 5, 2009 Filing 1875 REDACTED VERSION of # 1839 Second Declaration of David L. Herron by AMD International Sales & Service LTD, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Cottrell, Frederick) Modified on 6/8/2009 (nms).
June 5, 2009 Filing 1874 REDACTED VERSION of # 1809 Declaration of David L. Herron (Volume II) by AMD International Sales & Service LTD, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Cottrell, Frederick)
June 5, 2009 Filing 1873 REDACTED VERSION of # 1802 Declaration of David L. Herron (Volume I) by AMD International Sales & Service LTD, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Cottrell, Frederick)
June 5, 2009 Filing 1872 REDACTED VERSION of # 1801 Letter, by AMD International Sales & Service LTD, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Cottrell, Frederick)
June 5, 2009 Filing 1871 SEALED STIPULATION and Proposed Order With Respect To Certain Data Produced By Toshiba America Information Systems ("TAIS") by Phil Paul. (Herbert, Laina) Modified on 6/5/2009 (nms).
June 4, 2009 Filing 1870 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Objections with Objections as an Exhibit by Acer America Corporation re # 1869 Notice (Other) (McMahon, Peter)
June 4, 2009 Filing 1869 NOTICE of Objections to Subpoena by Acer America Corporation (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Acer America Corporation Objections)(McMahon, Peter)
June 4, 2009 Filing 1868 OBJECTIONS by AMD International Sales & Service LTD, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc. to # 1755 Notice to Take Deposition Objections of Advanced Micro Devices, Inc. and AMD International Sales & Service, Ltd. to Intel Corporation's Notice of Deposition Regarding AMD's Contentions . (Fineman, Steven)
June 4, 2009 REDACTION NOTICE: In accordance with section G of the Administrative Procedures Governing Filing and Service by Electronic Means, redacted versions of sealed documents shall be filed electronically within 5 business days of the filing of the sealed document. The records of this case do not reflect the filing of redacted versions of DI # 1838 and # 1839 . (nms)
June 4, 2009 REDACTION NOTICE: In accordance with section G of the Administrative Procedures Governing Filing and Service by Electronic Means, redacted versions of sealed documents shall be filed electronically within 5 business days of the filing of the sealed document. The records of this case do not reflect the filing of a redacted version of DI # 1833 . (nms)
June 4, 2009 REDACTION NOTICE: In accordance with section G of the Administrative Procedures Governing Filing and Service by Electronic Means, redacted versions of sealed documents shall be filed electronically within 5 business days of the filing of the sealed document. The records of this case do not reflect the filing of redacted versions of DI # 1801 and # 1802 . (nms)
June 4, 2009 REDACTION NOTICE: In accordance with section G of the Administrative Procedures Governing Filing and Service by Electronic Means, redacted versions of sealed documents shall be filed electronically within 5 business days of the filing of the sealed document. The records of this case do not reflect the filing of a redacted version of DI # 1809 . (nms)
June 4, 2009 Filing 1867 Letter to The Honorable Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. from Richard L. Horwitz regarding oral argument on Intel's Motion, Pursuant to Rules 16 and 56, For a Pretrial Conference to Seek the Court's Determination of Key Issues of Law That Will Govern Completion of Preparation and Trial. (Horwitz, Richard)
June 3, 2009 Filing 1866 NOTICE of Subpoena and Deposition of CDW Corporation on June 9, 2009 at 9:00 a.m. by Phil Paul (Attachments: # 1 Subpoena of CDW Corporation)(Herbert, Laina)
June 3, 2009 Filing 1865 Amended NOTICE of Deposition of Insight Enterprises, Inc. on June 9, 2009 at 9:00 a.m. by Phil Paul (Attachments: # 1 Subpoena of Insight Enterprises, Inc.)(Herbert, Laina)
June 3, 2009 Filing 1864 NOTICE of Subpoena and Deposition of Richard Walker on June 11, 2009 at 9:00 a.m. by Phil Paul (Attachments: # 1 Subpoena of Richard Walker)(Herbert, Laina)
June 2, 2009 Filing 1863 Second Amended NOTICE to Take Deposition of Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc. on June 10, 2009 at 10:00 a.m. by AMD International Sales & Service LTD, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc..(Fineman, Steven) Modified on 6/3/2009 (nms).
June 2, 2009 Filing 1862 NOTICE of Subpoena and Notice of Deposition of Richard Walker on June 11, 2009 at 9:00 a.m. by AMD International Sales & Service LTD, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc. (Fineman, Steven)
June 2, 2009 Filing 1861 REPLY MEMORANDUM re # 1785 Motion, Pursuant To Rules 16 And 56, For A Pretrial Conference To Seek The Court's Determination Of Key Issues Of Law That Will Govern Completion Of Preparation And Trial filed by Intel Kabushiki Kaisha, Intel Corporation.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 6/19/2009. (Drane, W.) Modified on 6/3/2009 (nms).
June 2, 2009 Filing 1860 Second Amended NOTICE of Taking Deposition of Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc. on June 10, 2009 at 10:00 a.m. by Phil Paul (Attachments: # 1 Subpoena of Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc.)(Herbert, Laina) Modified on 6/3/2009 (nms).
June 2, 2009 Filing 1859 Second Amended NOTICE to Take Deposition of Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc. on June 10, 2009, beginning at 10:00 a.m. by AMD International Sales & Service LTD, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 subpoena, # 2 certificate of service)(Hatcher, Laura) Modified on 6/3/2009 (nms).
June 2, 2009 Filing 1858 NOTICE of Subpoena Ad Testificandum - Best Buy Co., Inc., scheduled for June 8, 2009, with Subpoena, Exhibit A and Certificate of Service attached by Intel Kabushiki Kaisha, Intel Corporation (Drane, W.)
June 2, 2009 Filing 1857 REDACTED VERSION of # 1835 Response to Intel's Supplemental Submission in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, For Summary Judgment on AMD's Export Commerce Claim by AMD International Sales & Service LTD, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-D)(Cottrell, Frederick) Modified on 6/3/2009 (nms).
June 2, 2009 Filing 1856 Amended NOTICE of Deposition of Costco Wholesale Corporation on June 4, 2009 at 9:30 a.m. by Phil Paul (Attachments: # 1 Subpoena of Costco Wholesale Corporation)(Herbert, Laina)
June 2, 2009 Filing 1855 SEALED Transcript of Teleconference held on 05-12-09 before Judge Vincent J. Poppiti. (Transcript on file in Clerk's Office). (lad)
June 1, 2009 Filing 1854 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Jeff Groudan (Amended Notice of Deposition) on June 4, 2009 by AMD International Sales & Service LTD, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Subpoena)(Cottrell, Frederick)
June 1, 2009 Filing 1853 NOTICE of Subpoena and Deposition of Jeff Groudan on June 4, 2009 at 8:00 a.m. by Phil Paul (Attachments: # 1 Subpoena of Jeff Groudan)(Herbert, Laina)
June 1, 2009 Filing 1852 NOTICE of Subpoena and Deposition of Jeff Groudan on June 4, 2009, beginning at 8:00 a.m. by AMD International Sales & Service LTD, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 subpoena, # 2 certificate of service)(Cottrell, Frederick)
June 1, 2009 Filing 1851 NOTICE of Subpoena and Deposition of Lisa Sieker on June 11, 2009 at 1:00 p.m. by Phil Paul (Attachments: # 1 Subpoena of Lisa Sieker)(Herbert, Laina)
June 1, 2009 Filing 1850 NOTICE of Subpoena and Deposition of Tom Barton on June 12, 2009 at 9:00 a.m. by Phil Paul (Attachments: # 1 Subpoena of Tom Barton)(Herbert, Laina)
May 29, 2009 Filing 1849 NOTICE of Subpoena and Deposition of Tom Barton on June 12, 2009, beginning at 9:00 a.m. by AMD International Sales & Service LTD, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 subpoena, # 2 certificate of service)(Shandler, Chad)
May 29, 2009 Filing 1848 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Sony Electronics, Inc. pursuant to 30(b)(6) with Subpoena, Exhibit A and Certificate of Service attached on June 3, 2009, at 9:30 a.m. by Intel Kabushiki Kaisha, Intel Corporation.(Drane, W.)
May 29, 2009 Filing 1847 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Sony Corporation pursuant to 30(b)(6) with Subpoena and Certificate of Service attached on June 12, 2009 at 8:30 a.m. by Intel Kabushiki Kaisha, Intel Corporation.(Drane, W.)
May 29, 2009 Filing 1846 NOTICE of Subpoena and Deposition of Lisa Sieker on June 11, 2009, beginning at 1:00 p.m. by AMD International Sales & Service LTD, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 subpoena, # 2 certificate of service)(Shandler, Chad)
May 29, 2009 Filing 1845 NOTICE of Subpoena and Deposition of Dean Koester by Phil Paul (Attachments: # 1 Subpoena of Dean Koester)(Herbert, Laina)
May 29, 2009 Filing 1844 Amended NOTICE of Subpoena and Deposition of Todd Ford by Phil Paul (Attachments: # 1 Supoena of Todd Ford)(Herbert, Laina)
May 28, 2009 Filing 1843 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Dean Koester on June 2, 2009 by AMD International Sales & Service LTD, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Subpoena)(Cottrell, Frederick)
May 28, 2009 Filing 1842 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Todd Ford on June 1, 2009 by AMD International Sales & Service LTD, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Subpoena)(Cottrell, Frederick)
May 28, 2009 Filing 1841 NOTICE of Deposition of Sony Corporation on June 12, 2009 at 8:30 a.m. by Phil Paul (Attachments: # 1 Subpoena of Sony Corporation)(Herbert, Laina)
May 28, 2009 Filing 1840 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Sony Corporation on June 12, 2009 by Advanced Micro Devices, Inc..(Balick, Adam)
May 27, 2009 Filing 1839 SEALED DECLARATION of David L. Herron re # 1838 SEALED Letter by AMD International Sales & Service LTD, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Shandler, Chad) Modified on 5/28/2009 (nms).
May 27, 2009 Filing 1838 SEALED Letter to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti from Chad M. Shandler regarding further response to Intel's motion to compel testimony on questions Intel posed to AMD's designated Rule 30(b)(6) witnesses on preservation issues - re # 1801 Letter,. (Shandler, Chad)
May 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1837 SO ORDERED, re (1487 in 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1832 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1562 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF) Proposed ORDER re the Depositions to be taken of Keisuke Matsumoto and Kazuyuki Oji at the United States Consulate in Osaka, Japan (see Order for further details),. Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 5/27/2009. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
May 27, 2009 Filing 1836 NOTICE of Deposition of Advanced Micro Devices, Inc. and AMD International Sales & Service, LTD, pursuant to Rule 30(b)(6), scheduled for June 11, 2009, beginning at 9:00 a.m. by Intel Kabushiki Kaisha, Intel Corporation (Drane, W.)
May 26, 2009 Filing 1835 SEALED Response re # 1324 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Subject Matter Based Upon Rule 12(b)(1) Or In The Alternative, For Summary Judgment On AMD's Export Commerce Claim filed by AMD International Sales & Service LTD, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 6/5/2009. (Cottrell, Frederick) Modified on 6/9/2009 (nms).
May 26, 2009 Filing 1834 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Intel Corporation and Intel Kabashiki Kaisha's Response to Notice of Taking Deposition of Intel Corporation and Intel Kabusidki Kaisha Concerning Evidence Preservation and Completeness of Document Production, and Request for Production of Documents by Intel Corporation, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha, Intel Kabushiki Kaisha, Intel Corporation.(Horwitz, Richard)
May 26, 2009 Filing 1833 SEALED Letter to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti from Richard L. Horwitz regarding Reply in Support of Motion to Compel Further Deposition Responses - re (1396 in 1:05-cv-00441-JJF) Letter, (1739 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF) Letter. (Horwitz, Richard)
May 26, 2009 Filing 1832 Proposed ORDER re the Depositions to be taken of Keisuke Matsumoto and Kazuyuki Oji at the United States Consulate in Osaka, Japan (see Order for further details). Signed by Special Master Vincent J. Poppiti on 5/26/2009. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
May 22, 2009 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (1549 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF, 1817 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael G. McLellan filed by Phil Paul. Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 5/22/2009. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
May 22, 2009 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (1811 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1544 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Katherine T. Kelly filed by Phil Paul. Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 5/22/2009. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
May 22, 2009 Filing 1830 RESPONSE re # 1785 MOTION Pursuant To Rules 16 And 56, For A Pretrial Conference To Seek The Court's Determination Of Key Issues Of Law That Will Govern Completion Of Preparation And Trial filed by AMD International Sales & Service LTD, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Cottrell, Frederick) Modified on 5/26/2009 (nms).
May 22, 2009 Filing 1829 Amended NOTICE of Subpoena Ad Testificandum and Duces Tecum of David P. Kaplan on May 29, 2009 at 9:00 a.m. by Phil Paul (Attachments: # 1 Subpoena Ad Testificandum and Duces Tecum of David P. Kaplan)(Herbert, Laina)
May 22, 2009 Filing 1828 REDACTED VERSION of # 1760 Letter to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti re production issue by Intel Kabushiki Kaisha, Intel Corporation. (Drane, W.) (nms).
May 22, 2009 Filing 1827 REDACTED VERSION of # 1761 Supplemental Submission In Support Of Defendants' Motion To Dismiss, Or In The Alternative, For Summary Judgment On AMD's Export Commerce Claim by Intel Kabushiki Kaisha, Intel Corporation. (Drane, W.) Modified on 5/26/2009 (nms).
May 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1831 SO ORDERED re (1555 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF, 1824 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1479 in 1:05-cv-00441-JJF) Proposed Stipulation and Proposed Case Management Order No. 8. Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 5/21/2009. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
May 21, 2009 Filing 1826 OBJECTIONS to # 1815 Notice of Subpoena Ad Testificandum and Duces Tecum of David Kaplan. (Drane, W.) Modified on 5/26/2009 (nms).
May 20, 2009 Filing 1825 Amended NOTICE of Subpoena Ad Testificandum - OfficeMax Inc. with Subpoena, Exhibit A and Certificate of Service, scheduled for May 28, 2009, at 11:00 a.m. by Intel Kabushiki Kaisha, Intel Corporation (Horwitz, Richard)
May 20, 2009 Filing 1824 PROPOSED Stipulation and Case Management Order No. 8 (see Order for further details). Signed by Special Master Vincent J. Poppiti on 5/20/2009. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
May 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1823 ORDER directing Fujitsu to produce Document No.: 45464 to AMD by the close of business on May 21, 2009. Signed by Special Master Vincent J. Poppiti on 5/20/2009. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
May 20, 2009 Filing 1822 NOTICE of Subpoena and Deposition of NEC Corporation of American on June 5, 2009 at 9:00 a.m. by Phil Paul (Attachments: # 1 Subpoena of NEC Corporation)(Herbert, Laina)
May 20, 2009 Filing 1821 NOTICE of Subpoena and Deposition of Acer on June 5, 2009 at 9:00 a.m. by Phil Paul (Attachments: # 1 Subpoena of Acer)(Herbert, Laina)
May 20, 2009 Filing 1820 NOTICE of Subpoena and Deposition of Toshiba America Information Systems on June 5, 2009 at 9:00 a.m. by Phil Paul (Attachments: # 1 Subpoena of Toshiba America Information Systems)(Herbert, Laina)
May 20, 2009 Filing 1819 NOTICE of Subpoena and Deposition of Sony Electronics on June 3, 2009 at 9:00 a.m. by Phil Paul (Attachments: # 1 Subpoena of Sony Electronics)(Herbert, Laina)
May 20, 2009 Filing 1818 NOTICE of Withdrawal of D.I. 1816 by Intel Kabushiki Kaisha, Intel Corporation re # 1792 Letter to the Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti from W. Harding Drane, Jr regarding request for the Court to issue Order for the taking of depositions at the American Consulate General in Osaka, Japan (Drane, W.)
May 20, 2009 Filing 1817 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael G. McLellan - filed by Phil Paul. (Attachments: # 1 Certification By Counsel)(Herbert, Laina)
May 20, 2009 Filing 1816 SEALED Letter to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti from W. Harding Drane, Jr regarding Request for the Court to issue Order for the taking of depositions at the American Consulate General in Osaka, Japan. - re # 1792 Letter. (Drane, W.)
May 19, 2009 Filing 1815 NOTICE of Subpoena Ad Testificandum and Duces Tecum of David P. Kaplan on May 29, 2009 at 9:00 a.m. by Phil Paul (Attachments: # 1 Subpoena Ad Testificandum and Duces Tecum of David P. Kaplan)(Herbert, Laina)
May 19, 2009 Filing 1814 NOTICE of Subpoena and Deposition of Hewlett-Packard Company on June 11, 2009 at 9:00 a.m. by Phil Paul (Attachments: # 1 Subpoena of Hewlett-Packard)(Herbert, Laina)
May 19, 2009 Filing 1813 NOTICE of Subpoena and Deposition of Dell Corporation on June 12, 2009 at 9:00 a.m. by Phil Paul (Attachments: # 1 Subpoena of Dell Corporation)(Herbert, Laina)
May 19, 2009 Filing 1812 NOTICE of Subpoena and Deposition of Lenovo International on June 10, 2009 at 9:00 a.m. by Phil Paul (Attachments: # 1 Subpoena of Lenovo International)(Herbert, Laina)
May 19, 2009 Filing 1811 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Katherine T. Kelly - filed by Phil Paul. (Attachments: # 1 Certification By Counsel)(Herbert, Laina)
May 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1810 SO ORDERED re (1542 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF, 1808 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1465 in 1:05-cv-00441-JJF) Proposed Order Amending Procedures for the Handling of Discovery Disputes Before Special Master. Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 5/18/2009. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
May 18, 2009 Filing 1809 SEALED DECLARATION of David L. Herron (Volume II) re # 1801 Letter by AMD International Sales & Service LTD. (Cottrell, Frederick) Modified on 5/19/2009 (nms).
May 18, 2009 Filing 1808 PROPOSED ORDER re Amended Procedures for the Handling of Discovery Disputes Before Special Master. Signed by Special Master Vincent J. Poppiti on 5/18/2009. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
May 18, 2009 CORRECTING ENTRY: The docket text for D.I. 1802 has been amended to reflect that it is Volume I of the Declaration. (nms)
May 15, 2009 Filing 1807 NOTICE of Subpoena Ad Testificandum to Thomson Reuters (Markets) LLC with Exhibit A and Certificate of Service, scheduled for June 10, 2009 at 9:00 a.m. by Intel Kabushiki Kaisha, Intel Corporation (Drane, W.)
May 15, 2009 Filing 1806 NOTICE of Subpoena Ad Testificandum to FactSet Research Systems, Inc. with Exhibit A and Certificate of Service, scheduled for June 11, 2009 at 9:00 a.m. by Intel Kabushiki Kaisha, Intel Corporation (Drane, W.)
May 15, 2009 Filing 1805 NOTICE of Subpoena Ad Testificandum to Thomson Reuters Corporation with Exhibit A and Certificate of Service, scheduled for June 10, 2009, at 9:00 a.m. by Intel Kabushiki Kaisha, Intel Corporation (Drane, W.)
May 15, 2009 Filing 1804 NOTICE of Notice of Subpoena Ad Testificandum to Seeking Alpha, Inc., at 9:00 a.m. on June 9, 2009 with Exhibit A and Certificate of Service by Intel Kabushiki Kaisha, Intel Corporation (Drane, W.)
May 15, 2009 Filing 1803 NOTICE of Subpoeana Ad Testificandum to FactSet CallStreet, LLC at 9:00 a.m. on June 11, 2009 with Exhibit A and Certificate of Service by Intel Kabushiki Kaisha, Intel Corporation (Drane, W.)
May 14, 2009 Filing 1802 SEALED DECLARATION of David L. Herron (Volume I) re # 1801 Letter, by AMD International Sales & Service LTD, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Cottrell, Frederick) Modified on 5/18/2009 (nms).
May 14, 2009 Filing 1801 SEALED Letter to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti from Frederick L. Cottrell, III regarding AMD's letter brief in response to Intel's motion to compel further testimony in response to 130 questions it posed to AMD's designated Rule 30(b)(6) witnesses on evidence preservation issues - re # 1739 Letter. (Cottrell, Frederick)
May 14, 2009 Filing 1800 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Class Plaintiffs' Requests for Admission Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 36(a)(1)(B) by Phil Paul.(Herbert, Laina)
May 13, 2009 Filing 1799 REDACTED VERSION of # 1726 SEALED MOTION to Seal Request for International Judicial Assistance Pursuant to the Hague Convention of 18 March 1970 on the Taking of Evidence in Civil or Commercial Matters by AMD International Sales & Service LTD, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Cottrell, Frederick)
May 13, 2009 Filing 1798 REDACTED VERSION of # 1725 SEALED MOTION to Seal Request for International Judicial Assistance Pursuant to the Hague Convention of 18 March 1970 on the Taking of Evidence in Civil or Commercial Matters by AMD International Sales & Service LTD, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Cottrell, Frederick)
May 13, 2009 Filing 1797 REDACTED VERSION of # 1724 SEALED MOTION to Seal Request for International Judicial Assistance Pursuant to the Hague Convention of 18 March 1970 on the Taking of Evidence in Civil or Commercial Matters by AMD International Sales & Service LTD, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Cottrell, Frederick)
May 13, 2009 Filing 1796 REDACTED VERSION of # 1723 SEALED MOTION to Seal Request for International Judicial Assitance Prusuant to the Hague Convention of 18 March 1970 on the Taking of Evidence in Civil or Commercial Matters by AMD International Sales & Service LTD, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Cottrell, Frederick)
May 13, 2009 Filing 1795 Letter to the Court, dated 5/13/2009, from Special Master Vincent J. Poppiti, advising of new contact information. (nms)
May 13, 2009 REDACTION NOTICE: In accordance with section G of the Administrative Procedures Governing Filing and Service by Electronic Means, redacted versions of sealed documents shall be filed electronically within 5 business days of the filing of the sealed document. The records of this case do not reflect the filing of redacted versions of DI # 1760 and # 1761 . (nms)
May 13, 2009 Filing 1794 REDACTED VERSION of # 1783 Letter by AMD International Sales & Service LTD, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Cottrell, Frederick) (nms).
May 13, 2009 Filing 1793 REDACTED VERSION of # 1757 Letter by AMD International Sales & Service LTD, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Cottrell, Frederick) (nms).
May 13, 2009 Filing 1792 SEALED Letter to The Honorable Vincent J. Poppiti from W. Harding Drane, Jr. regarding request for the Court to issue Order for the taking of depositions at the American Consulate General in Osaka, Japan. (Drane, W.) (nms).
May 12, 2009 Filing 1791 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (a) Intel Corporation's and Intel Kabushiki Kaisha's Third Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiffs Advanced Micro Devices, Inc. and AMD International Sales & Service, Ltd., and (b) Intel Corporation's and Intel Kabushiki Kaisha's Supplement to The First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiffs Advanced Micro Devices, Inc. and AMD International Sales & Service, Ltd. by Intel Kabushiki Kaisha, Intel Corporation.(Drane, W.)
May 12, 2009 REDACTION NOTICE: In accordance with section G of the Administrative Procedures Governing Filing and Service by Electronic Means, redacted versions of sealed documents shall be filed electronically within 5 business days of the filing of the sealed document. The records of this case do not reflect the filing of a redacted version of DI # 1656 . (nms)
May 12, 2009 REDACTION NOTICE: In accordance with section G of the Administrative Procedures Governing Filing and Service by Electronic Means, redacted versions of sealed documents shall be filed electronically within 5 business days of the filing of the sealed document. The records of this case do not reflect the filing of a redacted version of DI # 1739 . (nms)
May 12, 2009 REDACTION NOTICE: In accordance with section G of the Administrative Procedures Governing Filing and Service by Electronic Means, redacted versions of sealed documents shall be filed electronically within 5 business days of the filing of the sealed document. The records of this case do not reflect the filing of a redacted version of DI # 1757 . (nms)