Alcoa Inc. v. Alcan Inc. et al
Defendant: Century Aluminum Company, Pechiney Rolled Products LLC and Alcan Inc.
Cross Claimant: Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC
Counter Claimant: Pechiney Cast Plate Inc
Counter Defendant: Alcoa Inc.
Case Number: 1:2006cv00451
Filed: July 25, 2006
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Bataillon
Referring Judge: Sherry R Fallon
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 467 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL. (CASE CLOSED). Signed by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon on 11/10/2021. (nmg)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 466 STIPULATION of Dismissal and [Proposed] Order by Alcoa Inc.. (Fineman, Steven)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Joseph F. Bataillon: Telephone Conference held on 9/28/2021. (Total Time in Court: 12 minutes) (Court Reporter Dale Hawkins.) (mal)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 465 ORAL ORDER - A Telephone Conference is set for 9/28/2021 at 04:00 PM before Judge Joseph F. Bataillon to address settlement of this matter. Counsel will be provided call in instructions via email. Signed by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon on 9/24/2021. (Lawrence, Tiwauna)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Joseph F. Bataillon - Telephone Conference held on 9/23/2021. (Total Time in Court:13 minutes) (Court Reporter: Dale Hawkins.) (myr)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 464 ORAL ORDER - Upon notification from the parties, the trial in this matter scheduled for September 20, 2021 is cancelled. A Telephone Conference will be held on 9/23/2021 at 11:30 AM Eastern Standard Time before Judge Joseph F. Bataillon to address settlement of this matter. Counsel will be provided call in instructions via email. Signed by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon on 9/20/2021. (Lawrence, Tiwauna)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 463 Official Transcript of Pretrial Conference held on 08/20/2021 before Judge Joseph T. Bataillon. Court Reporter/Transcriber Deanna Warner,Email: warnerdeanna@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or order/purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/12/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/21/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/20/2021. (dh)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Juliet A. Markowitz for Alcoa Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (srs)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #461 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Katherine J. Kunberger, #460 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Juliet Markowitz. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 9/16/2021. (lih)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 462 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove David B. Sadwick as co-counsel. Reason for request: no longer with firm. (Fineman, Steven)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 461 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Katherine J. Kunberger ov Tatro Tekosky Sadwick LLP - filed by Alcoa Inc.. (Fineman, Steven)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 460 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Juliet Markowitz of Tatro Tekosky Sadwick LLP - filed by Alcoa Inc.. (Fineman, Steven)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Joseph F. Bataillon - Status Conference held on 8/20/2021. (Court Reporter Deanna Warner.) (kmd)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER: The Bench Trial in this matter scheduled for September 20, 2021, will be held in courtroom 2A. Counsel should coordinate with the Clerk's office regarding A/V testing and setup. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon on 8/20/2021. (kmd)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 459 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Thomas F. McAndrew - filed by Century Aluminum Company. (Dugan, Mary)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #459 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Thomas F. McAndrew filed by Century Aluminum Company. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 8/6/2021. (Polito, Rebecca)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 458 ORAL ORDER - The status hearing to discuss any issues that may arise in trial has been rescheduled to August 20, 2021, at 1:00 p.m. before the undersigned in a courtroom to be determined in the J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building, 844 N. King Street, Wilmington, Delaware. Signed by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon on 7/22/2021. (Lawrence, Tiwauna)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 457 ORDER - A status hearing to discuss any issues that may arise in trial will be held before the undersigned on August 23, 2021, at 9:00 a.m. in a courtroom to be determined in the J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building, 844 N. King Street, Wilmington, Delaware. The order of presentation and allotted trial time set forth in earlier orders remains in effect. The parties shall submit Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law to the Court within three weeks after the conclusion of the bench trial and any responses thereto within one week thereafter. A jury trial on any remaining issues will be set at a later date. Signed by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon on 1/15/2021. (amf)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 456 ORDER: The defendant Pechineys motion for continuance is granted. Trial in this matter is scheduled at 9:00 am, September 20, 2021, in a courtroom to be determined in the J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building, Wilmington, DE. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that pretrial filing deadlines are continued. A separate order will be entered setting filing deadlines. Signed by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon on 01/04/2021. (sam)
December 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 455 RESPONSE to Motion re #454 MOTION to Continue the Trial filed by Alcoa Inc.. (Fineman, Steven) Modified on 1/4/2021 (lih).
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 454 MOTION to Continue the Trial - filed by Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc. (Lydon, Tiffany) Modified on 1/4/2021 (lih).
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 453 ORDER: The trial in this matter remains scheduled for February 8, 2021 and will be held virtually, in whole or in part, depending on the availability of counsel and the witnesses. The courtroom for trial will be located in the Roman Hruska Federal Courthouse located in Omaha, Nebraska. See Order for further detail. Signed by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon on 12/18/2020. (kmd)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon - Telephone Conference held on 12/14/2020. (Court Reporter Brenda Fauber) (Lawrence, Tiwauna)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 452 ORAL ORDER - The court will hold a telephone conference on December 14, 2020 at 1:30 p.m. Central Standard Time to discuss the bench trial scheduled for February 8, 2021. Counsel will be provided call in instructions via email. Signed by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon on 12/9/2020. (Lawrence, Tiwauna)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 451 ORDER: The Trial is continued to 2/8/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge Joseph F. Bataillon, location tbd. The order of presentation and allotted trial time set forth in this Courts earlier order remain in effect. (See Order for further detail.) Signed by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon on 9/24/2020. (kmd)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Trial Management Order Deadlines: A Bench Trial is set for 2/8/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (kmd)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 450 Official Transcript of Telephonic Pretrial Conference held on March 12, 2020 before Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. Court Reporter: Susan M. DeVetter, Phone: (402) 661-7309. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or order/purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 8/10/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/20/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/19/2020. (nmg)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 449 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER (*See Order for Detail). Signed by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon on 3/13/2020. (nmg)
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 448 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER (*See Order for Details). Signed by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon on 3/10/2020. (nmg)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 447 Amended Joint Proposed Pretrial Order by Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Alcoa Inc., Century Aluminum Company, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 8, #2 Exhibit 9, #3 Exhibit 10, #4 Exhibit 14, #5 Exhibit 15, #6 Exhibit 16)(Lydon, Tiffany) Modified on 3/11/2020 (lih).
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 446 ORAL ORDER per the phone conference with counsel on March 9, 2020, the pretrial conference will now be held via phone conference on March 12, 2020 at 11:00 EDT. Call in information has been provided to counsel via email. This oral order hereby amends D.I. #351 and 438 . Signed by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon on 03/10/2020.(AEV)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 445 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re D.I. #437 -5, Ex. 20 to Ex. 27 Proposed Pretrial Order. IT IS ORDERED that the parties' motions in limine are GRANTED and DENIED as set forth in this order. Signed by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon on 3/9/2020. (amf) Modified on 3/9/2020 (amf).
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 444 MOTION for leave to Supplement Response to Order - filed by Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Pechiney's Proposed Supplement)(Lydon, Tiffany) Modified on 3/9/2020 (lih).
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 443 ORAL ORDER re due to court availability, the bench trial in this matter before Judge Joseph F. Bataillon will be held at the J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building, 844 N. King Street, Courtroom 2A, Wilmington, DE on March 23, 2020 at 9:00 AM. This order hereby amends D.I. #351 Order to Set Deadlines/Hearings, and D.I. #426 Memorandum and Order Setting Scheduling Order Deadlines. Signed by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon on 03/06/2020. (AEV)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 442 RESPONSE to Motion re #427 MOTION to Realign Pechiney as the Plaintiff filed by Alcoa Inc.. (Fineman, Steven)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 441 REDACTED VERSION of #434 Response to Order by Alcoa Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - D)(Fineman, Steven) Modified on 3/4/2020 (lih).
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 440 JOINDER by Alcoa Inc. joining in #439 Response to Order. (Fineman, Steven) Modified on 3/2/2020 (lih).
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 439 RESPONSE to Order re #426 Memorandum Order filed by Century Aluminum Company. (Dugan, Mary) Modified on 3/2/2020 (lih).
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 438 ORAL ORDER D.I. 160 is hereby amended to reflect that the Pretrial Conference scheduled for March 12, 2020 at 10:00 AM will now be held in front of Judge Bataillon. The pretrial conference will be held at the J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building, 844 N. King Street, Courtroom 6C, Wilmington, DE. Signed by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon on 02/28/2020. (AEV)
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 437 [SEALED] Joint Proposed Pretrial Order by Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-7, #2 Exhibit 8-10, #3 Exhibit 11-13, #4 Exhibit 14-16, #5 Exhibit 17-27)(Lydon, Tiffany) Modified on 2/28/2020 (lih).
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 436 STIPULATION Regarding Exhibit Lists by Alcoa Inc.. (Fineman, Steven) Modified on 2/27/2020 (lih).
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 435 DECLARATION re #432 Response to Order by Century Aluminum Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-14 to Declaration)(Dugan, Mary)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 434 [SEALED] RESPONSE to Order re #426 Memorandum Order filed by Alcoa Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D)(Fineman, Steven) Modified on 2/26/2020 (lih).
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 433 RESPONSE to Order re #426 Memorandum Order.(Lydon, Tiffany) Modified on 2/26/2020 (lih).
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 432 RESPONSE to Order re #426 Memorandum Order filed by Century Aluminum Company. (Dugan, Mary) Modified on 2/26/2020 (lih).
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 431 NOTICE of Appearance by Katharine Lester Mowery on behalf of Alcoa Inc. (Mowery, Katharine)
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 430 STIPULATION to Dismiss Common Law Claims Against Alcoa Inc. by Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc. (Lydon, Tiffany) Modified on 2/25/2020 (lih).
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 429 REPLY to Response to Motion re #427 MOTION to Realign Pechiney as the Plaintiff filed by Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc. (Lydon, Tiffany)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 428 RESPONSE to Motion re #427 MOTION to Realign Pechiney as the Plaintiff filed by Century Aluminum Company. (Dugan, Mary)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Motions No Longer Referred: #427 MOTION to Realign Pechiney as the Plaintiff (lih)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 427 MOTION to Realign Pechiney as the Plaintiff - filed by Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order).(Lydon, Tiffany) Modified on 2/20/2020 (lih).
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 426 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, The parties motions for summary judgment (D.I. #370 , #374 , #376 , #381 , #384 , #385 , and #387 ) are granted in part and denied in part as set forth in this Memorandum and Order. On the Courts own motion, the parties demands for a jury trial are stricken. The matter is set for a bench trial before the undersigned at the Roman Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plz., Omaha, Nebraska on March 23, 2020 at 9:00 a.m. The parties may object or otherwise respond to the Courts jury trial ruling within seven days of the date of this order. *See Memorandum and Order for further details*. Signed by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon on 2/14/2020. (lak)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #425 Stipulation to extend deadlines for motions in limine filed by Century Aluminum Company. Signed by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon on 02/10/2020. (AEV)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 425 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Relating to Submission of Motions in Limine re #287 Stipulation by Century Aluminum Company. (Dugan, Mary)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 424 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Defendant Century Aluminum Co's (Century) motion (D.I. #423 ) to reconsider is DENIED. Signed by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon on 2/3/2020. (amf)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Joseph F. Bataillon - Oral Argument regarding pending motions for summary judgment held on 1/29/2020. (Court Reporter Val Gunning.) (amf)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 423 MOTION for Reconsideration re #422 Memorandum and Order - filed by Century Aluminum Company. (Dugan, Mary) Modified on 1/29/2020 (lih).
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 422 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff Alcoa's motion to exclude certain testimony of John Woodyard (D.I. #312 ) is DENIED. Defendant Century's motion to disqualify expert witness A.J. Gravel (D.I. #309 ) is DENIED. Plaintiff Alcoa's and defendant Century's joint motion for an order deferring certain challenges to expert testimony or in the alternative excluding certain expert testimony from such experts (D.I. #306 ) is DENIED. Defendant Pechiney's motions to exclude the opinions and testimony of Christopher Hunt, Ph.D. and Ronald O. Hamburger (D.I. #300 ), Anton Raviraj Arulanantham, Ph.D. (D.I. #298 ), Jonathan W. Rohrer (D.I. #296 ), and Steven Hastings (D.I. #294 ) are DENIED; and Plaintiff Alcoa's and defendant Century's joint motion to exclude the testimony of A.J. Gravel (D.I. #291 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon on 1/28/2020. (amf)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER re #420 Stipulation Narrowing Issues Raised in Summary Judgment Motions filed by Century Aluminum Company and Alcoa Inc. is hereby granted. Signed by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon on 01/28/2020.(AEV)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 421 NOTICE of Subsequent Authority by Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc re #387 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Lydon, Tiffany) Modified on 1/24/2020 (lih).
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 420 STIPULATION Narrowing Issues Raised in #385 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #384 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Century Aluminum Company. (Dugan, Mary) Modified on 1/22/2020 (lih).
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 419 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, Oral Argument on the pending motions for summary judgment are scheduled for a morning hearing before the undersigned on 29th of January 2020 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 4B, 844 North King St., Wilmington, DE 19801-3570. See Order for further details. Signed by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon on 1/8/2020. (lak)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 418 DECLARATION re #417 Reply Brief by Century Aluminum Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 33-36)(Dugan, Mary) Modified on 12/30/2019 (lih).
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 417 REPLY BRIEF re #376 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment on Pechiney's CERCLA Claims filed by Century Aluminum Company. (Dugan, Mary) Modified on 12/30/2019 (lih).
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 416 REPLY BRIEF re #384 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to the Century/Alcoa Acquisition Agreement filed by Alcoa Inc.. (Fineman, Steven) Modified on 12/30/2019 (lih).
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 415 DECLARATION of David B. Sadwick re #414 Reply Brief by Alcoa Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit AA)(Fineman, Steven) Modified on 12/30/2019 (lih).
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 414 REPLY BRIEF re #387 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Pechiney's First Counterclaim Against Alcoa for Cost Recovery Under CERCLA Sec. 107(a) filed by Alcoa Inc.. (Fineman, Steven) Modified on 12/30/2019 (lih).
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 413 DECLARATION of Tiffany Geyer Lydon re #411 Reply Brief by Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit BZ-CB)(Lydon, Tiffany) Modified on 12/30/2019 (lih).
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 412 REPLY BRIEF re #385 MOTION for Summary Judgment to Allocate Liability, if Any, Between Century Aluminum Company and Alcoa Inc. filed by Century Aluminum Company. (Dugan, Mary) Modified on 12/30/2019 (lih).
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 411 REPLY BRIEF re #374 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Against Century Aluminum Company filed by Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc. (Lydon, Tiffany) Modified on 12/30/2019 (lih).
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 410 REPLY BRIEF re #370 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Against Alcoa Inc. filed by Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc. (Lydon, Tiffany) Modified on 12/30/2019 (lih).
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 409 DECLARATION re #408 Reply Brief by Century Aluminum Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 51, #2 Exhibit 52, #3 Exhibit 53)(Dugan, Mary) Modified on 12/30/2019 (lih).
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 408 REPLY BRIEF re #381 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Pechiney's and Century's Cross-Claims Regarding Contractual Indemnification filed by Century Aluminum Company. (Dugan, Mary) Modified on 12/30/2019 (lih).
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 407 REDACTED VERSION of #358 Reply Brief by Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc. (Lydon, Tiffany)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: The text of D.I. #394 has been corrected per the request of the filer. (lih)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 406 [SEALED] DECLARATION of David B. Sadwick re #405 Answering Brief in Opposition by Alcoa Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-BB)(Fineman, Steven) Modified on 11/19/2019 (lih).
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 405 [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #387 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Pechiney's First Counterclaim Against Alcoa for Cost Recovery Under CERCLA Sec. 107(a) filed by Alcoa Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 11/22/2019. (Fineman, Steven) Modified on 11/19/2019 (lih).
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 404 DECLARATION of Tiffany Geyer Lydon re #399 Answering Brief in Opposition, #400 Answering Brief in Opposition, #401 Answering Brief in Opposition by Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit AU-BF, #2 Exhibit BG, #3 Exhibit BH (Part 1 of 2), #4 Exhibit BH (Part 2 of 2), #5 Exhibit BI-BV, #6 Exhibit BW-BY)(Lydon, Tiffany) Modified on 11/19/2019 (lih).
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 403 DECLARATION of David B. Sadwick re #402 Memorandum in Opposition by Alcoa Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-L)(Fineman, Steven) Modified on 11/19/2019 (lih).
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 402 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #385 MOTION for Summary Judgment to Allocate Liability, if Any, Between Century Aluminum Company and Alcoa Inc. filed by Alcoa Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 11/22/2019. (Fineman, Steven) Modified on 11/19/2019 (lih).
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 401 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #376 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment on Pechiney's CERCLA Claims filed by Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 11/22/2019. (Lydon, Tiffany) Modified on 11/19/2019 (lih).
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 400 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #381 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Pechiney's and Century's Cross-Claims Regarding Contractual Indemnification filed by Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 11/22/2019. (Lydon, Tiffany) Modified on 11/19/2019 (lih).
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 399 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #387 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 11/22/2019. (Lydon, Tiffany) Modified on 11/19/2019 (lih).
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 398 DECLARATION re #397 Declaration, #396 Answering Brief in Opposition by Century Aluminum Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 40-49, #2 Exhibit 50, Part 1, #3 Exhibit 50, Part 2, #4 Exhibit 50, Part 3, #5 Exhibit 50, Part 4, #6 Exhibit 50, Part 5, #7 Exhibit 50, Part 6, #8 Exhibit 50, Part 7, #9 Exhibits 51-55)(Dugan, Mary)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 397 DECLARATION re #396 Answering Brief in Opposition by Century Aluminum Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Part 1, #2 Exhibit 1, Part 2, #3 Exhibit 2-17, #4 Exhibit 18-38, #5 Exhibit 39, Part 1, #6 Exhibit 39, Part 2, #7 Exhibit 39, Part 3)(Dugan, Mary)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 396 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #374 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Against Century Aluminum Company filed by Century Aluminum Company.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 11/22/2019. (Dugan, Mary) Modified on 11/19/2019 (lih).
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 395 DECLARATION re #394 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Century Aluminum Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-4, #2 Exhibit 5, Part 1, #3 Exhibit 5, Part 2, #4 Exhibits 6-19, #5 Exhibit 20, Part 1, #6 Exhibit 20, Part 2, #7 Exhibit 20, Part 3, #8 Exhibit 20, Part 4, #9 Exhibit 20, Part 5, #10 Exhibit 20, Part 6, #11 Exhibit 20, Part 7, #12 Exhibit 21)(Dugan, Mary)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 394 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #384 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to the Century/Alcoa Acquisition Agreement .Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 11/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dugan, Mary) Modified on 11/15/2019 (lih). Modified on 11/19/2019 (lih).
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #393 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for answering briefs. Set Briefing Schedule: Answering Briefs due 11/15/2019. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 11/15/2019. (lih)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 393 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for parties to file sumary judgment response briefs to through and including November 15, 2019 - filed by Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc. (Fineman, Steven)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: D.I.'s #378 and #379 updated to reflect correct link's in filing (lak)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: D.I. #383 main document replaced to correctly reflect filing. (lak)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 392 DECLARATION of David B. Sadwick re #391 Opening Brief in Support by Alcoa Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-F)(Fineman, Steven) Modified on 9/30/2019 (lih).
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 391 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #384 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to the Century/Alcoa Acquisition Agreement filed by Alcoa Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 10/11/2019. (Fineman, Steven) Modified on 9/30/2019 (lih).
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 390 DECLARATION of David B. Sadwick re #389 Opening Brief in Support by Alcoa Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-M, #2 Exhibit N-Y, #3 Exhibit Z)(Fineman, Steven) Modified on 9/30/2019 (lih).
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 389 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #387 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Pechiney's First Counterclaim Against Alcoa for Cost Recovery Under CERCLA Sec. 107(a) filed by Alcoa Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 10/11/2019. (Fineman, Steven) Modified on 9/30/2019 (lih).
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 388 DECLARATION of Mary F. Dugan re #386 Opening Brief in Support by Century Aluminum Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 and 2, #2 Exhibit 3 through 6, #3 Exhibit 7, Part I, #4 Exhibit 7, Part II, #5 Exhibit 8 through 42)(Dugan, Mary) Modified on 9/30/2019 (lih).
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 387 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Pechiney's First Counterclaim Against Alcoa for Cost Recovery Under CERCLA Sec. 107(a) - filed by Alcoa Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fineman, Steven) Modified on 9/30/2019 (lih).
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 386 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #385 MOTION for Summary Judgment to Allocate Liability, if Any, Between Century Aluminum Company and Alcoa Inc. filed by Century Aluminum Company.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 10/11/2019. (Dugan, Mary) Modified on 9/30/2019 (lih).
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 385 MOTION for Summary Judgment to Allocate Liability, if Any, Between Century Aluminum Company and Alcoa Inc. - filed by Century Aluminum Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dugan, Mary) Modified on 9/30/2019 (lih).
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 384 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to the Century/Alcoa Acquisition Agreement - filed by Alcoa Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fineman, Steven) Modified on 9/30/2019 (lih).
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 383 DECLARATION of Mary F. Dugan re #382 Opening Brief in Support by Century Aluminum Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 through 3, #2 Exhibit 4 through 7, #3 Exhibit 8, Part I, #4 Exhibit 8, Part II, #5 Exhibit 9 through 45, #6 Exhibit 46 through 50)(Dugan, Mary) (Main Document 383 replaced on 9/30/2019) (lak). Modified on 9/30/2019 (lih).
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 382 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #381 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Pechiney's and Century's Cross-Claims Regarding Contractual Indemnification filed by Century Aluminum Company.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 10/11/2019. (Dugan, Mary) Modified on 9/30/2019 (lih).
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 381 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Pechiney's and Century's Cross-Claims Regarding Contractual Indemnification - filed by Century Aluminum Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order s)(Dugan, Mary) Modified on 9/30/2019 (lih).
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 380 DECLARATION of Mary F. Dugan re #376 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment by Century Aluminum Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, Part I, #3 Exhibit 2, Part II, #4 Exhibit 3 through 11, #5 Exhibit 12 through 17, #6 Exhibit 18 through 22, #7 Exhibit 23 through 26, #8 Exhibit 27 through 29, #9 Exhibit 30, Part I, #10 Exhibit 30, Part II, #11 Exhibit 30, Part III, #12 Exhibit 31, Part I, #13 Exhibit 31, Part II, #14 Exhibit 32)(Dugan, Mary) Modified on 9/30/2019 (lih).
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 379 APPENDIX (Part II of II) re #371 Opening Brief in Support, #375 Opening Brief in Support by Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit AB-AC, #2 Exhibit AD-AP, #3 Exhibit AQ-AR, #4 Exhibit AS-AT)(Lydon, Tiffany) Modified on 9/30/2019 (lih).
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 378 APPENDIX (Part I of II) re #371 Opening Brief in Support, #375 Opening Brief in Support by Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C, #2 Exhibit D-H, #3 Exhibit I-R, #4 Exhibit S-Z)(Lydon, Tiffany) Modified on 9/30/2019 (lih).
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 377 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #376 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment on Pechiney's CERCLA Claims filed by Century Aluminum Company.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 10/11/2019. (Dugan, Mary) Modified on 9/30/2019 (lih).
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 376 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment on Pechiney's CERCLA Claims - filed by Century Aluminum Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order s)(Dugan, Mary) Modified on 9/30/2019 (lih).
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 375 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #374 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Against Century Aluminum Company filed by Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 10/11/2019. (Lydon, Tiffany) Modified on 9/30/2019 (lih).
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 374 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Against Century Aluminum Company - filed by Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lydon, Tiffany) Modified on 9/30/2019 (lih).
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 373 DECLARATION of Gerald Pepper re #371 Opening Brief in Support by Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc. (Lydon, Tiffany) Modified on 9/30/2019 (lih).
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 372 DECLARATION of Linda Conlan re #371 Opening Brief in Support by Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc. (Lydon, Tiffany) Modified on 9/30/2019 (lih).
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 371 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #370 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Against Alcoa Inc. filed by Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 10/11/2019. (Lydon, Tiffany) Modified on 9/30/2019 (lih).
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 370 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Against Alcoa Inc. - filed by Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lydon, Tiffany) Modified on 9/30/2019 (lih).
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 369 STIPULATION regarding tax documents pursuant to the Court's August 28, 2019 Order by Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc. (Lydon, Tiffany) Modified on 9/23/2019 (lih).
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 368 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Alcoa, Inc.'s Supplemental Response to Pechiney Parties' Requests for Admissions (Set One) Numbers 7-21, 33-39, 42-73, 78-82, 84-88, 104, 106-117, 132, 134, 139-142 filed by Alcoa Inc..(Fineman, Steven)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 367 STIPULATION to Amended Scheduling Order by Alcoa Inc.. (Fineman, Steven) Modified on 9/17/2019 (lih).
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 366 DECLARATION of Mary F. Dugan re #293 Declaration by Century Aluminum Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(Dugan, Mary) Modified on 9/13/2019 (lih).
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 365 REPLY BRIEF re #291 Joint MOTION to Preclude the Testimony of A.J. Gravel filed by Century Aluminum Company. (Dugan, Mary) Modified on 9/13/2019 (lih).
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 364 DECLARATION of Christine Haynes re #363 Reply Brief by Alcoa Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-2)(Fineman, Steven) Modified on 9/13/2019 (lih).
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 363 REPLY BRIEF re #306 Joint MOTION for an Order Deferring Certain Challenges to Expert Testimony or Exclude Certain Expert Testimony filed by Alcoa Inc.. (Fineman, Steven) Modified on 9/13/2019 (lih).
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 362 DECLARATION of Christine D. Haynes re #361 Reply Brief by Alcoa Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Fineman, Steven) Modified on 9/13/2019 (lih).
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 361 REPLY BRIEF re #312 MOTION to Preclude Certain Testimony of John Woodyard filed by Alcoa Inc.. (Fineman, Steven) Modified on 9/13/2019 (lih).
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 360 DECLARATION of Tiffany Geyer Lydon re #359 Reply Brief by Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit BE, #2 Exhibit BF)(Lydon, Tiffany) Modified on 9/13/2019 (lih).
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 359 REPLY BRIEF re #300 MOTION to Preclude the Opinions and Testimony of Christopher Hunt, Ph.D. and Ronald O. Hamburger filed by Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc. (Lydon, Tiffany) Modified on 9/13/2019 (lih).
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 358 [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re #294 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Steven Hastings filed by Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc. (Lydon, Tiffany)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 357 REPLY BRIEF re #298 MOTION to Preclude the Opinions and Testimony of Anton Raviraj Arulanantham, Ph.D. filed by Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc. (Lydon, Tiffany) Modified on 9/13/2019 (lih).
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 356 REPLY BRIEF re #296 MOTION to Preclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Jonathan W. Rohrer filed by Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc. (Lydon, Tiffany) Modified on 9/13/2019 (lih).
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 355 REDACTED VERSION of #322 Declaration by Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc. (Lydon, Tiffany) Modified on 9/11/2019 (lih).
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 354 REDACTED VERSION of #329 Letter by Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc. (Lydon, Tiffany) Modified on 9/11/2019 (lih).
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 353 REDACTED VERSION of #323 Declaration by Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc. (Lydon, Tiffany) Modified on 9/11/2019 (lih).
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 352 REDACTED VERSION of #321 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc. (Lydon, Tiffany)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Set Hearings: Pretrial Conference set for 3/12/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6C before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. (lih)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 351 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER, Proposed Pretrial Order due by February 27, 2020. Pretrial Conference set for March 12, 2020 at 10:00 AM. A 10-day Jury Trial is set for March 23, 2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. Signed by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon on 9/7/2019. (lak) (Main Document 351 replaced on 9/9/2019) (lak).
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: D.I. #351 document replaced to reflect correct case number. (lak)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 350 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Supplemental Responses to Interrogatories (Set Two) filed by Alcoa Inc..(Fineman, Steven)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 349 REDACTED VERSION of #346 Declaration by Century Aluminum Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-5)(Dugan, Mary) Modified on 9/9/2019 (lih).
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 348 REDACTED VERSION of #332 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Century Aluminum Company. (Dugan, Mary)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 347 Official Transcript of Teleconference held on 8/28/2019 before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. Court Reporter/Transcriber Dale C. Hawkins,Telephone number 573-6196. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/26/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/7/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/4/2019. (dh)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 346 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #332 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Century Aluminum Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-5)(Dugan, Mary)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 345 REDACTED VERSION of #327 Declaration by Century Aluminum Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(Dugan, Mary) Modified on 9/5/2019 (lih).
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 344 DECLARATION re #330 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Century Aluminum Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-7)(Dugan, Mary)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 343 REDACTED VERSION of #325 Letter, by Century Aluminum Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-20)(Dugan, Mary)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order REDACTION NOTICE: In accordance with section G of the Administrative Procedures Governing Filing and Service by Electronic Means, redacted versions of sealed documents shall be filed electronically within 7 days of the filing of the sealed document. The records of this case do not reflect the filing of a redacted version of DI #329 . (lih)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: The declarations and supporting exhibits previously attached to D.I. numbers #330 and #332 have been deleted due to documents being filed incorrectly. Counsel is advised to re-file the declarations separately using the appropriate event code. (lih)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: The redacted version of D.I. #327 previously attached to D.I. #331 has been deleted due to document being filed incorrectly. Counsel is advised to re-file the document separately using the appropriate event code. (lih)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 342 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Notice of Deposition and Subpoena on Earl Clinkenbeard filed by Century Aluminum Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Dugan, Mary)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Remark - Per the request of the filer, D.I. #334 has been modified to reflect that the document is associated with D.I. #291 . (Polito, Rebecca)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sherry R. Fallon - Discovery Dispute Telephone Conference held on 8/28/2019. (Court Reporter D. Hawkins.) (lih)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 341 DECLARATION of David B. Sadwick re #340 Memorandum in Opposition by Alcoa Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-G)(Fineman, Steven) Modified on 9/5/2019 (lih).
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 340 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #300 MOTION to Preclude the Opinions and Testimony of Christopher Hunt, Ph.D. and Ronald O. Hamburger filed by Alcoa Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 9/4/2019. (Fineman, Steven) Modified on 9/5/2019 (lih).
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 339 DECLARATION of David B. Sadwick re #337 Memorandum in Opposition by Alcoa Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-G)(Fineman, Steven) Modified on 9/5/2019 (lih).
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 338 DECLARATION re #337 Memorandum in Opposition [Declaration of Anton Raviraj Arulanantham, Ph.D.] by Alcoa Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C)(Fineman, Steven)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 337 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #298 MOTION to Preclude the Opinions and Testimony of Anton Raviraj Arulanantham, Ph.D. filed by Alcoa Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 9/4/2019. (Fineman, Steven) Modified on 9/4/2019 (lih).
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 336 APPENDIX re #335 Answering Brief in Opposition, #333 Answering Brief in Opposition, #334 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit AT-BD)(Lydon, Tiffany)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 335 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #306 Joint MOTION for an Order Deferring Certain Challenges to Expert Testimony or Exclude Certain Expert Testimony filed by Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 9/4/2019. (Lydon, Tiffany) Modified on 9/4/2019 (lih).
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 334 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #291 MOTION to Disqualify Expert Witness A.J. Gravel filed by Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 9/4/2019. (Lydon, Tiffany) Modified on 8/29/2019 (Polito, Rebecca). Modified on 9/4/2019 (lih).
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 333 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #312 MOTION to Preclude Certain Testimony of John Woodyard filed by Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 9/4/2019. (Lydon, Tiffany) Modified on 9/4/2019 (lih).
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 332 [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #294 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Steven Hastings filed by Century Aluminum Company.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 9/4/2019. (Attachments: #7 Certificate of Service)(Dugan, Mary) Modified on 9/4/2019 (lih).
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 331 REDACTED VERSION re #326 Reply Brief filed by Century Aluminum Company. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Mary F. Dugan in Support of Century Aluminum Company's Reply Brief in Support of its Motion to Disqualify Expert Witness A.J. Gravel, # 2 Exhibit A-B)(Dugan, Mary) Modified on 8/28/2019 (kmd).
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 330 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #296 MOTION to Preclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Jonathan W. Rohrer filed by Century Aluminum Company.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 9/4/2019. (Dugan, Mary) Modified on 9/4/2019 (lih). Modified on 9/4/2019 (lih).
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER: The transcript of the August 28, 2019, discovery dispute teleconference shall serve as the Order of the court. In accordance with the rulings made on the record: (1) Century Aluminum Companys motion to compel production of Pechiney Cast Plate Inc.s tax and accounting documents is denied, as a complete production has been made; (2) Century Aluminum Companys motion to compel production of sales-related documents is denied, as the documents are not relevant and proportional to the issues presented in this case; and (3) Century Aluminum Companys motion to compel production of the consolidated tax returns of Pechiney Cast Plate Inc.s parent companies is granted in part, without prejudice. The parties shall meet and confer and Pechiney shall provide a stipulation consistent with the representations made on the record at the discovery dispute teleconference on or before September 11, 2019. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 8/28/2019. (Polito, Rebecca)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 329 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Tiffany Geyer Lydon regarding #325 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(Lydon, Tiffany) Modified on 8/23/2019 (lih).
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 328 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Elizabeth Deshaies - filed by Century Aluminum Company. (Dugan, Mary)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #328 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Elizabeth Deshaies. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 8/22/2019. (lih)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Elizabeth Deshaies for Century Aluminum Company added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 327 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Mary F. Dugan re #326 Reply Brief by Century Aluminum Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(Kinkus, Jennifer) Modified on 8/22/2019 (lih).
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 326 [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re #309 MOTION to Disqualify Expert Witness A.J. Gravel filed by Century Aluminum Company. (Kinkus, Jennifer) Modified on 8/22/2019 (lih).
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 325 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Mary F. Dugan regarding Discovery Dispute. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-20)(Kinkus, Jennifer) Modified on 8/21/2019 (lih). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/21/2019: #2 Certificate of Service) (lih).
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: The certificate of service previously filed as D.I. 326 has been deleted and attached to D.I. #325 . Counsel are advised that certificates of service are not to be e-filed separately. (lih)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #324 Joint MOTION for Teleconference to Resolve Discovery Dispute. A Telephone Conference is set for 8/28/2019 at 11:00 AM before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. Century Aluminum Company shall initiate the call to 302-573-4557. In preparation for this hearing the parties shall follow the Discovery Matters and Disputes procedure as set forth in the Order regarding discovery matters available at www.ded.uscourts.gov/judge/magistrate-judge-sherry-r-fallon. Set Deadlines: Moving submission due by no later than 3:00 PM on 8/22/2019; Responsive submission due by no later than 3:00 PM on 8/23/2019.) Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 8/19/2019. (lih)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 324 Joint MOTION for Teleconference to Resolve Discovery Dispute - filed by Century Aluminum Company. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Dugan, Mary) Modified on 8/19/2019 (lih).
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 323 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Lisa Simpson re #321 Answering Brief in Opposition by Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc. (Lydon, Tiffany) Modified on 8/15/2019 (lih).
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 322 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #321 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lydon, Tiffany)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 321 [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #309 MOTION to Disqualify Expert Witness A.J. Gravel filed by Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 8/21/2019. (Lydon, Tiffany) Modified on 8/15/2019 (lih).
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 320 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Alcoa Inc.'s Rebuttal Witness List filed by Alcoa Inc..(Fineman, Steven)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 319 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Century Aluminum Company's Fact Witness Disclosure filed by Century Aluminum Company.(Dugan, Mary)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 318 REDACTED VERSION of #305 Exhibit to a Document by Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc. (Lydon, Tiffany) Modified on 8/8/2019 (lih).
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 317 REDACTED VERSION of #295 Opening Brief in Support by Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc. (Lydon, Tiffany) Modified on 8/8/2019 (lih).
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 316 REDACTED VERSION of #311 Declaration by Century Aluminum Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-15)(Dugan, Mary) Modified on 8/7/2019 (lih).
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 315 REDACTED VERSION of #310 Opening Brief in Support by Century Aluminum Company. (Dugan, Mary) Modified on 8/7/2019 (lih).
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: The declaration and related exhibits previously attached to D.I. #292 have been deleted. Counsel is advised to re-file the declaration separately using the appropriate event code. (lih)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: The declaration previously filed as D.I. 315 has been deleted as it was a duplicate version of D.I. #308 in an attempt to correct a deficiency with D.I. #308 . The correct exhibits are now attached to D.I. #308 . (lih)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Motions No Longer Referred: #296 MOTION to Preclude, #294 MOTION to Exclude, #298 MOTION to Preclude, #306 Joint MOTION to Preclude, #291 Joint MOTION to Preclude, #300 MOTION to Preclude, #309 MOTION to Preclude, #312 MOTION to Preclude. Counsel is advised to refrain from sending courtesy copies of the aforementioned items to Judge Fallon's chambers. (lih)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: D.I. #293 has been replaced with a revised version of the document per the request of the filer. (lih)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 314 DECLARATION of David B. Sadwick re #313 Opening Brief in Support by Alcoa Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D)(Fineman, Steven) Modified on 8/1/2019 (lih).
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 313 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #312 MOTION to Preclude Certain Testimony of John Woodyard filed by Alcoa Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 8/14/2019. (Fineman, Steven) Modified on 8/1/2019 (lih).
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 312 MOTION to Preclude Certain Testimony of John Woodyard - filed by Alcoa Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 7.1.1 Certification).(Fineman, Steven) Modified on 8/1/2019 (lih).
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 311 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Mary F. Dugan re #309 MOTION to Disqualify Expert Witness A.J. Gravel by Century Aluminum Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 through 15)(Dugan, Mary) Modified on 8/1/2019 (lih).
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 310 [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re #309 MOTION to Disqualify Expert Witness A.J. Gravel filed by Century Aluminum Company.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 8/14/2019. (Dugan, Mary) Modified on 8/1/2019 (lih).
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 309 MOTION to Disqualify Expert Witness A.J. Gravel - filed by Century Aluminum Company. (Attachments: #1 Rule 7.1.1 Statement, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Dugan, Mary) Modified on 8/1/2019 (lih).
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 308 DECLARATION re #306 Joint MOTION for an Order Deferring Certain Challenges to Expert Testimony or Exclude Certain Expert Testimony by Century Aluminum Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-7)(Dugan, Mary) Modified on 8/1/2019 (lih). (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/1/2019) (lih).
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 307 Joint OPENING BRIEF in Support re #306 Joint MOTION for an Order Deferring Certain Challenges to Expert Testimony or Exclude Certain Expert Testimony filed by Century Aluminum Company.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 8/14/2019. (Dugan, Mary) Modified on 8/1/2019 (lih).
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 306 Joint MOTION for an Order Deferring Certain Challenges to Expert Testimony or Exclude Certain Expert Testimony - filed by Century Aluminum Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Rule 7.1.1 Certification)(Dugan, Mary) Modified on 8/1/2019 (lih).
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 305 [SEALED] EXHIBIT re #303 Appendix, #304 Appendix, #302 Appendix by Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc. (Lydon, Tiffany) Modified on 8/1/2019 (lih).
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 304 APPENDIX Volume III of III re #301 Opening Brief in Support, #299 Opening Brief in Support, #295 Opening Brief in Support, #297 Opening Brief in Support by Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit AB-AS)(Lydon, Tiffany) Modified on 8/1/2019 (lih).
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 303 APPENDIX Volume II of III re #301 Opening Brief in Support, #299 Opening Brief in Support, #295 Opening Brief in Support, #297 Opening Brief in Support by Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit K-Z)(Lydon, Tiffany) Modified on 8/1/2019 (lih).
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 302 APPENDIX Volume I of III re #301 Opening Brief in Support, #299 Opening Brief in Support, #295 Opening Brief in Support, #297 Opening Brief in Support by Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D, #2 Exhibit F-J)(Lydon, Tiffany) Modified on 8/1/2019 (lih).
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 301 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #300 MOTION to Preclude the Opinions and Testimony of Christopher Hunt, Ph.D. and Ronald O. Hamburger filed by Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 8/14/2019. (Lydon, Tiffany) Modified on 8/1/2019 (lih).
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 300 MOTION to Preclude the Opinions and Testimony of Christopher Hunt, Ph.D. and Ronald O. Hamburger - filed by Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order).(Lydon, Tiffany) Modified on 8/1/2019 (lih).
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 299 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #298 MOTION to Preclude the Opinions and Testimony of Anton Raviraj Arulanantham, Ph.D. filed by Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 8/14/2019. (Lydon, Tiffany) Modified on 8/1/2019 (lih).
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 298 MOTION to Preclude the Opinions and Testimony of Anton Raviraj Arulanantham, Ph.D. - filed by Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Lydon, Tiffany) Modified on 8/1/2019 (lih).
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 297 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #296 MOTION to Preclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Jonathan W. Rohrer filed by Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 8/14/2019. (Lydon, Tiffany) Modified on 8/1/2019 (lih).
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 296 MOTION to Preclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Jonathan W. Rohrer - filed by Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lydon, Tiffany) Modified on 8/1/2019 (lih).
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 295 [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re #294 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Steven Hastings filed by Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 8/14/2019. (Lydon, Tiffany)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 294 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Steven Hastings - filed by Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lydon, Tiffany) Modified on 8/1/2019 (lih).
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 293 DECLARATION re #291 Joint MOTION to Preclude the Testimony of A.J. Gravel by Century Aluminum Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-6)(Dugan, Mary) Modified on 8/1/2019 (lih). (Main Document 293 replaced on 8/1/2019) (lih).
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 292 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #291 Joint MOTION to Preclude the Testimony of A.J. Gravel filed by Century Aluminum Company.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 8/14/2019. (Dugan, Mary) Modified on 8/1/2019 (lih).
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 291 Joint MOTION to Preclude the Testimony of A.J. Gravel - filed by Century Aluminum Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Rule 7.1.1 Certification).(Dugan, Mary) Modified on 8/1/2019 (lih).
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 290 NOTICE OF SERVICE of The Pechiney Parties' Fact Witness List filed by Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc.(Lydon, Tiffany)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 289 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Century Aluminum Company's Fact Witness Disclosure filed by Century Aluminum Company.(Dugan, Mary)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 288 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Alcoa Inc.'s Fact Witness List filed by Alcoa Inc..(Fineman, Steven)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #287 Stipulation. SetScheduling Order Deadlines ( Motion for Summary Judgment due by 9/19/2019., Answering Brief due 11/14/2019., Reply Brief due 12/19/2019.) (PLEASE REFER TO STIPULATION FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 7/2/2019. (lih)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 287 STIPULATION and Amended Scheduling Order re #280 Proposed Order by Alcoa Inc.. (Fineman, Steven)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 286 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Renee Kalmes on March 7, 2019 filed by Alcoa Inc..(Fineman, Steven)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 285 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kelly E. Mannion - filed by Century Aluminum Company. (Dugan, Mary)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 284 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Robert C. Welsh as co-counsel. Reason for request: no longer with firm. (Lydon, Tiffany)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Matthew D. Thurlow for Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC and Pechiney Cast Plate Inc added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ddp)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #285 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kelly E. Mannion. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 2/27/2019. (lih)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 283 NOTICE of Subpoena Duces Tecum and Subpoena Ad Testificandum to Renee Kalmes by Alcoa Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-2)(Fineman, Steven)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 282 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Matthew D. Thurlow - filed by Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc. (Lydon, Tiffany)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #282 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Matthew D. Thurlow. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 2/26/2019. (lih)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 281 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Thomas F. McAndrew. formerly of Winston & Strawn LLP as co-counsel.. (Dugan, Mary)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #280 Stipulated SCHEDULING ORDER. Set SCHEDULING ORDER deadlines: ( Expert Discovery due by 5/31/2019., Dispositive Motions due by 9/12/2019., Answering Brief due 11/13/2019., Reply Brief due 12/17/2019., Motions in Limine due by 2/7/2020.) (PLEASE REFER TO STIPULATION FOR FURTHER DETAILS. ) Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 12/19/2018. (lih)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 280 Stipulated amended scheduling order re #277 Order, #279 Letter by Alcoa Inc.. (Fineman, Steven) Modified on 12/17/2018 (lih).
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: Docket clerk has deleted the proposed order previously attached to D.I. #279 . Counsel is advised to re-file the document separately using the proposed order event code. (lih)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 279 Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Steven J. Fineman regarding joint status and amended scheduling order. ( Fineman, Steven) Modified on 12/17/2018 (lih).
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 278 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Jennifer A. Miller as co-counsel.. (Dugan, Mary)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 277 ORDER- Pursuant to the Trial Scheduling teleconference on 10/16/2018, on or before 12/14/2018, counsel shall provide a joint proposed amended scheduling order with a chart of deadlines that includes the revised dates for the rescheduled pretrial conference and trial. Set Scheduling Order Deadlines ( Proposed Pretrial Order due by 3/17/2020., A Pretrial Conference is set for 3/31/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6C before Judge Sherry R. Fallon., A Jury Trial is set for 4/13/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge Joseph F. Bataillon.) Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 10/16/2018. (lih)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sherry R. Fallon - Telephone Conference held on 10/16/2018. (Court Reporter S. Ingram (Hawkins Reporting).) (lih)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 276 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Nicole E. Wrigley as co-counsel.. (Dugan, Mary)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: Pursuant to conversation with counsel, docket clerk has deleted the notice of removal previously filed as D.I. 276. Counsel will re-file the document shortly. (lih)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- granting #275 Stipulation to stay expert discovery. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: counsel shall submit a joint status report that includes a proposed amended case schedule on or before 11/30/2018. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 9/25/2018. (lih)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 275 STIPULATION Regarding Case Schedule by Century Aluminum Company. (Dugan, Mary) Modified on 9/24/2018 (lih).
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 274 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Expert Rebuttal Reports of: (1) Gaynor Dawson, (2) Michael C. Kavanaugh, Ph.D., P.E., (3) Anton Raviraj Arulanantham, Ph.D., (4) Christopher Hunt, Ph.D., P.E., G.E., and (5) Ronald O. Hamburger, S.E. filed by Alcoa Inc..(Fineman, Steven)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: the court shall conduct a status teleconference on 10/16/2018 at 11:30 AM before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. Counsel for the plaintiff shall initiate the call to 302-573-4557. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 9/10/2018. (lih)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- GRANTING #273 Letter Request. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: the teleconference to discuss ADR previously set in this matter for today is RESCHEDULED to 9/12/2018 at 04:00 PM before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. Counsel for the plaintiff shall initiate the call to 302-573-4557. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 9/5/2018. (lih)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 273 Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Steven J. Fineman regarding request to reschedule 9-5-18 ADR teleconference. (Fineman, Steven)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 272 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Rebuttal Expert Report of A.J. Gravel; (2) Rebuttal Expert Report of Walter J. Shields; (3) Rebuttal Expert Report of Peter M. Mesard; (4) Rebuttal Expert Report of John P. Woodyard; (5) Rebuttal Expert Report of Renee M. Kalmes; and (6) Rebuttal Expert Report of Paul Vidas filed by Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc.(Lydon, Tiffany)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 271 NOTICE of service of Rebuttal Expert Report of Jon Rohrer by Century Aluminum Company (Dugan, Mary)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 270 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Sonja A. Inglin as co-counsel. Reason for request: no longer with firm. (Lydon, Tiffany)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 269 REDACTED VERSION of #247 Letter by Century Aluminum Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-B)(Dugan, Mary) Modified on 8/13/2018 (lih).
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 268 REDACTED VERSION of #211 Letter by Century Aluminum Company. (Dugan, Mary) Modified on 8/13/2018 (lih).
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 267 REDACTED VERSION of #204 Letter by Century Aluminum Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1 - 13, #2 Exhibits 14 - 26)(Dugan, Mary) Modified on 8/13/2018 (lih).
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 266 REDACTED VERSION of #260 Exhibit to a Document by Alcoa Inc.. (Haynes, Christine)
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- re #204 Sealed Letter, #211 Sealed Letter, #247 Sealed Letter, and #260 Sealed Exhibit to a Document. The time for compliance with the court's deadline for submission of proposed redactions to the aforementioned documents, filed under seal, having expired on 12/15/2017; 1/9/2018; 5/9/2018; and 6/22/2018, without a request for an extension for good cause, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the aforementioned documents will be unsealed for viewing on the public docket on 8/14/2018. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 8/7/2018. (lih)
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order SECOND REDACTION NOTICE: In accordance with section G of the Administrative Procedures Governing Filing and Service by Electronic Means, redacted versions of sealed documents shall be filed electronically within 7 days of the filing of the sealed document. The records of this case do not reflect the filing of a redacted version of DI #260 . (lih)
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 265 REDACTED VERSION of #249 Letter by Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-8)(Lydon, Tiffany)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order REDACTION NOTICE: In accordance with section G of the Administrative Procedures Governing Filing and Service by Electronic Means, redacted versions of sealed documents shall be filed electronically within 7 days of the filing of the sealed document. The records of this case do not reflect the filing of a redacted version of DI #247 and #249 . (lih)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: The deficiency notice regarding D.I. #247 and #249 has been corrected. (lih)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order REDACTION NOTICE: In accordance with section G of the Administrative Procedures Governing Filing and Service by Electronic Means, redacted versions of sealed documents shall be filed electronically within 7 days of the filing of the sealed document. The records of this case do not reflect the filing of a redacted version of DI #260 . (lih)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order FOURTH REDACTION NOTICE: In accordance with section G of the Administrative Procedures Governing Filing and Service by Electronic Means, redacted versions of sealed documents shall be filed electronically within 7 days of the filing of the sealed document. The records of this case do not reflect the filing of a redacted version of DI #204 and #211 . (lih)
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 264 ORDER Setting Teleconference: plaintiffs counsel shall initiate the call. A Telephone Conference is set for 9/5/2018 at 11:00 AM before Judge Sherry R. Fallon to discuss ADR. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 7/2/2018. (lih)
June 20, 2018 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: The transcript of the June 19, 2018 discovery dispute teleconference shall serve as order of the court. For the reasons stated on the transcript, Alcan Rolled Products-Ravenswood, LLC, f/k/a Pechiney Rolled Products, LLC, and Pechiney Cast Plate, Inc.'s (together, Pechiney) motion to compel (D.I. 257) is GRANTED-IN-PART: (1) Pechiney is granted leave to take the continued deposition of Alcoa Inc.s Rule 30(b)(6) witness, Jamie Mackay, for up to a total of seven hours, and the continued deposition must occur on or before July 20, 2018, and (2) Pechiney's motion to compel is DENIED-IN-PART, without prejudice, with respect to Pechiney's demand for production of approximately 90 pages of notes prepared by the Rule 30(b)(6) witness, Jamie Mackay, based on the Third Circuit Court of Appeals decision in Sporck v. Peil, 759 F.2d 312 (3d Cir. 1985). Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 6/20/2018. (lih)
June 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sherry R. Fallon - Discovery Dispute Telephone Conference held on 6/19/2018. (Court Reporter T. Carroll (Hawkins Reporting).) (lih)
June 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 263 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Expert Report of A.J. Gravel; (2) Expert Report of Walter J. Shields; (3) Expert Report of Peter M. Mesard; (4) Expert Report of John P. Woodyard; (5) Expert Report of Robert A. Iezzi; and (6) Rule 26(a)(2)(C) Disclosure filed by Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc.(Lydon, Tiffany)
June 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 262 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Expert Report of Gaynor Dawson, (2) Expert Opinions of Michael C. Kavanaugh, Ph.D., P.E., and (3) Expert Report of Anton Rivaraj Arulanantham, Ph.D. filed by Alcoa Inc..(Haynes, Christine)
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 261 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Analysis of Federal Tax Issues Relating to Pechiney Cast Plate, Inc., and Related Companies by Steven C. Hastings, CPA/ABV/CFF, CGMA, ASA, CVA; (2) Expert Report of Jon Rohrer, P.G.; and (3) this Notice filed by Century Aluminum Company.(Dugan, Mary)
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 260 [SEALED] EXHIBIT re #259 Letter by Alcoa Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Fineman, Steven) Modified on 6/15/2018 (lih).
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 259 Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Steven J. Fineman regarding discovery dispute. (Fineman, Steven)
June 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 258 Joint STATUS REPORT by Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc. (Lydon, Tiffany)
June 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 257 Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Tiffany Geyer Lydon regarding discovery dispute. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(Lydon, Tiffany)
June 5, 2018 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: The text of the oral order dated 6/1/18 has been modified to reflect the correct response date. (lih)
June 1, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #253 Joint MOTION for teleconference to resolve discovery dispute. The court shall hear the discovery dispute during the status teleconference previously set in this matter for 6/19/2018 at 11:00 AM. Counsel for the Pechiney shall initiate the call to 302-573-4557. In preparation for this hearing the parties shall follow the Discovery Matters and Disputes procedure as set forth in the Order regarding discovery matters available at www.ded.uscourts.gov/judge/magistrate-judge-sherry-r-fallon. Set Deadlines: (Moving Submission due by no later than 11:00 AM on 6/8/2018, Responsive submission due by no later than 11:00 AM on 6/15/2018.). Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 6/1/2018. (lih) Modified on 6/5/2018 (lih).
May 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 256 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Alcoa Inc.'s Supplemental Objections and Responses to Pechiney Parties' Requests for Admission (Set Two) filed by Alcoa Inc..(Haynes, Christine)
May 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 255 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Alcoa Inc.'s Amended and Supplemental Objections and Responses to Pechiney Parties' Requests for Admission (Set One) filed by Alcoa Inc..(Haynes, Christine)
May 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 254 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Century Aluminum Company's Further Supplemental Objections and Responses to the Pechiney Parties' Requests for Admission filed by Century Aluminum Company.(Dugan, Mary)
May 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 253 Joint MOTION for teleconference to resolve discovery dispute - filed by Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Lydon, Tiffany)
May 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 252 Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Tiffany Geyer Lydon regarding Pechiney's update regarding privilege log issues. (Lydon, Tiffany)
May 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 251 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Thomas F. McAndrew - filed by Century Aluminum Company. (Dugan, Mary)
May 11, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #251 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Thomas F. McAndrew. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 5/11/2018. (lih)
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sherry R. Fallon - Discovery Dispute Telephone Conference held on 5/9/2018. (Court Reporter V. Gunning.) (lih)
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: The transcript of the 5/9/2018 teleconference shall serve as order of the court. As ordered on the transcript, Century Aluminum Company and Alcoa Inc. shall respond to the outstanding requests for admission served by Alcan Rolled Products-Ravenswood, LLC, f/k/a Pechiney Rolled Products, LLC, and Pechiney Cast Plate, Inc. (collectively, "Pechiney") on or before May 24, 2018, unless the parties otherwise agree and stipulate. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 5/9/2018. (lih)
May 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 250 Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Mary F. Dugan, Esq. regarding Responsive Letter re Discovery Dispute. (Dugan, Mary)
May 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 249 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Tiffany Geyer Lydon re #247 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-8)(Lydon, Tiffany) Modified on 5/4/2018 (lih).
May 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 248 Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Steven J. Fineman regarding discovery dispute - re #247 Letter. (Fineman, Steven)
May 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 247 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Mary F. Dugan, Esquire regarding Discovery Dispute with Exhibits A-B Attached. (Dugan, Mary)
May 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 246 Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Tiffany Geyer Lydon regarding Pechiney's discovery dispute issue. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-H)(Lydon, Tiffany)
May 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 245 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel by Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc (Lydon, Tiffany)
May 2, 2018 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- granting #243 Letter Request. Counsel shall submit an updated report on or before 5/14/2018. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 5/2/2018. (lih)
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 244 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Sam Falcon Trimbach - filed by Century Aluminum Company. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Sam Falcon Trimbach)(Dugan, Mary)
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #244 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Sam Falcon Trimbach. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 5/1/2018. (lih)
April 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 243 Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Tiffany Geyer Lydon regarding Pechiney's update regarding privilege log issues. (Lydon, Tiffany)
April 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 242 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Alcoa Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Pechiney Parties' Third Set of Interrogatories filed by Alcoa Inc..(Fineman, Steven)
April 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 241 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Alcoa Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Pechiney Parties' Requests for Admission (Set Two) filed by Alcoa Inc..(Fineman, Steven)
April 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 240 Amended CROSSCLAIM against Century Aluminum Company - filed by Pechiney Cast Plate Inc, Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC.(Lydon, Tiffany)
April 26, 2018 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- granting email request to include additional disputes. Set Deadlines: (Moving Submissions due by no later than 3:00 PM on 5/2/2018, Responsive submissions due by no later than 3:00 PM on 5/4/2018.) Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 4/26/2018. (lih)
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 239 NOTICE OF SERVICE of The Pechiney Parties' Responses to Century Aluminum Company's Fourth Set of Interrogatories filed by Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc.(Lydon, Tiffany)
April 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 238 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Century Aluminum Company's Responses and Objections to the Pechiney Parties' Third Set of Interrogatories filed by Century Aluminum Company.(Dugan, Mary)
April 19, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #237 Joint MOTION for Teleconference to Resolve Discovery Dispute. A Telephone Conference is set for 5/9/2018 at 11:00 AM before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. Counsel for the Pechiney shall initiate the call to 302-573-4557. In preparation for this hearing the parties shall follow the Discovery Matters and Disputes procedure as set forth in the Order regarding discovery matters available at www.ded.uscourts.gov/judge/magistrate-judge-sherry-r-fallon. Set Deadlines: (Moving Submission due by no later than 3:00 PM on 5/3/2018, Responsive submission due by no later than 3:00 PM on 5/4/2018.) Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 4/19/2018. (lih)
April 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 237 Joint MOTION for Teleconference to Resolve Discovery Dispute - filed by Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Lydon, Tiffany)
April 18, 2018 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- granting re #236 Letter Request. Counsel shall submit an updated report on or before 4/30/2018. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 4/18/2018. (lih)
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 236 Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Tiffany Geyer Lydon regarding Pechiney's update regarding privilege log issues. (Lydon, Tiffany)
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 235 REDACTED VERSION of #229 Letter by Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc. (Lydon, Tiffany)
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 234 REDACTED VERSION of #225 Letter by Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc. (Lydon, Tiffany)
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 233 REDACTED VERSION of #223 Letter by Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc. (Lydon, Tiffany)
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 232 REDACTED VERSION of #222 Letter by Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc. (Lydon, Tiffany)
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 231 REDACTED VERSION of #215 Letter by Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc. (Lydon, Tiffany)
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order THRID REDACTION NOTICE: In accordance with section G of the Administrative Procedures Governing Filing and Service by Electronic Means, redacted versions of sealed documents shall be filed electronically within 7 days of the filing of the sealed document. The records of this case do not reflect the filing of a redacted version of DI #204 . (lih)
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order THIRD NOTICE: Per Magistrate Judge Fallon's Standing Order Regarding Courtesy Copies, which requires two (2) courtesy copies of all briefs and two (2) copies of any other document filed in support of any briefs (i.e., appendices, exhibits, declarations, affidavits etc.), please submit to the Clerk's Office a copy of D.I. #211 . (lih)
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order REDACTION NOTICE: In accordance with section G of the Administrative Procedures Governing Filing and Service by Electronic Means, redacted versions of sealed documents shall be filed electronically within 7 days of the filing of the sealed document. The records of this case do not reflect the filing of a redacted version of DI #225 . (lih)
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order REDACTION NOTICE: In accordance with section G of the Administrative Procedures Governing Filing and Service by Electronic Means, redacted versions of sealed documents shall be filed electronically within 7 days of the filing of the sealed document. The records of this case do not reflect the filing of a redacted version of DI #222 . (lih)
April 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 230 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Notice of Subpoena filed by Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc.(Lydon, Tiffany)
April 4, 2018 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- granting #229 Letter Request. Counsel shall submit an updated report on or before 4/16/2018. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 4/4/2018. (lih)
April 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 229 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Tiffany Geyer Lydon regarding Pechiney's update regarding privilege log issues. (Lydon, Tiffany)
March 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 228 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Pechiney Parties' Third Set of Interrogatories to Century Aluminum Company filed by Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc.(Lydon, Tiffany)
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- granting #225 Letter Request. Counsel shall submit an updated report on or before 4/2/2018. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 3/28/2018. (lih)
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 227 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Century Aluminum Company's Fourth Set of Interrogatories to the Pechiney Parties filed by Century Aluminum Company.(Dugan, Mary)
March 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 226 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Pechiney Parties' Second Set of Requests for Admission to Alcoa, Inc. and Pechiney Parties' Third Set of Interrogatories to Alcoa, Inc. filed by Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc.(Lydon, Tiffany)
March 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 225 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Tiffany Geyer Lydon regarding Pechiney's update regarding privilege log issues. (Lydon, Tiffany)
March 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 224 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Objections and Responses of John Millett to Pechiney's Subpoena for Document Production and (2) Objections and Responses of A.J. Ursic to Pechiney's Subpoena for Document Production filed by Alcoa Inc..(Haynes, Christine)
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- granting #223 Letter Request. Counsel shall submit an updated report on or before 3/16/2018. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 3/6/2018. (lih)
March 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 223 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Tiffany Geyer Lydon regarding privilege log issues. (Lydon, Tiffany)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- granting #222 Letter Request. Counsel shall submit an updated report on or before 3/2/2018. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 2/21/2018. (lih)
February 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 222 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Tiffany Geyer Lydon regarding Pechiney's Update on Privilege Log Issues. (Lydon, Tiffany)
February 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 221 NOTICE OF SERVICE of The pechiney Parties' Objections and Responses to Century Aluminum Company's Rule 30(b)(6) Notice of Deposition filed by Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc.(Lydon, Tiffany)
February 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 220 REDACTED VERSION of #213 Letter by Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc. (Lydon, Tiffany) Modified on 2/16/2018 (lih).
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 219 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Constellium Rolled Products Ravenswood, LLC, Formerly Alcan Rolled Products-Ravenswood LLC, and Pechiney Cast Plate, Inc.'s Notice of Subpoenas to (1) John Arthur Millett; (2) Albert J. Ursic, Jr.; and (3) Terry L. Fearington filed by Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc.(Lydon, Tiffany)
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 218 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoena Served on Xebec Realty Partners filed by Century Aluminum Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Dugan, Mary)
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 217 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoena Served on Fruitland Owner LLC filed by Century Aluminum Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Dugan, Mary)
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 216 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoena Served on Boyle at 54th, LLC filed by Century Aluminum Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Dugan, Mary)
February 6, 2018 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- granting #215 Letter Request. Counsel shall submit an updated report on or before 2/16/2018. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 2/6/2018. (lih)
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #214 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Pursuant to Rule 502(d) of the Federal Rules of Evidence. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 2/1/2018. (lih)
January 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 215 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Tiffany Geyer Lydon regarding Pechiney's update regarding privilege log issues. (Lydon, Tiffany)
January 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 214 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Pursuant to Rule 502(d) of the Federal Rules of Evidence by Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lydon, Tiffany)
January 17, 2018 Opinion or Order SECOND REDACTION NOTICE: In accordance with section G of the Administrative Procedures Governing Filing and Service by Electronic Means, redacted versions of sealed documents shall be filed electronically within 7 days of the filing of the sealed document. The records of this case do not reflect the filing of a redacted version of DI #211 . (lih)
January 17, 2018 Opinion or Order SECOND REDACTION NOTICE: In accordance with section G of the Administrative Procedures Governing Filing and Service by Electronic Means, redacted versions of sealed documents shall be filed electronically within 7 days of the filing of the sealed document. The records of this case do not reflect the filing of a redacted version of DI #204 . (lih)
January 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 213 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Tiffany Geyer Lydon regarding Pechiney's Update on Privilege Log Issues. (Lydon, Tiffany)
January 12, 2018 Opinion or Order REDACTION NOTICE: In accordance with section G of the Administrative Procedures Governing Filing and Service by Electronic Means, redacted versions of sealed documents shall be filed electronically within 7 days of the filing of the sealed document. The records of this case do not reflect the filing of a redacted version of DI #204 . (lih)
January 12, 2018 Opinion or Order REDACTION NOTICE: In accordance with section G of the Administrative Procedures Governing Filing and Service by Electronic Means, redacted versions of sealed documents shall be filed electronically within 7 days of the filing of the sealed document. The records of this case do not reflect the filing of a redacted version of DI #211 . (lih)
January 11, 2018 Opinion or Order NOTICE: Per Magistrate Judge Fallon's Standing Order Regarding Courtesy Copies, which requires two (2) courtesy copies of all briefs and two (2) copies of any other document filed in support of any briefs (i.e., appendices, exhibits, declarations, affidavits etc.), please submit to the Clerk's Office two copies of D.I. #211 . (lih)
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Robert C. Welsh for Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (nmg)
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #212 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Robert C. Welsh. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 1/10/2018. (lih)
January 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 212 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Robert C. Welsh - filed by Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc. (Lydon, Tiffany)
January 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 211 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Mary F. Dugan regarding Pechineys Privilege Logs. (Dugan, Mary) Modified on 1/2/2018 (lih).
January 2, 2018 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: The letters previously filed as D.I. 211 and 212 has been deleted. The sealed version of the letter shall be refiled by counsel at a later time. (lih)
December 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 210 SO ORDERED- re #209 Stipulation. Set SCHEDULING ORDER deadlines: ( Fact Discovery completed by 5/2/2018., Opening Expert Reports due by 6/15/2018., Rebuttal Expert Reports due by 8/24/2018., Expert Discovery due by 10/26/2018., Dispositive Motions due by 12/10/2018., Answering Brief due 2/8/2019., Reply Brief due 3/8/2019., A Pretrial Conference is set for 10/21/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6C before Judge Sherry R. Fallon., A Jury Trial is set for 11/5/2019 at 09:30 AM before Judge Joseph F. Bataillon.)(PLEASE REFER TO STIPULATION FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 12/28/2017. (lih)
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 209 STIPULATION Amending Case Schedule by Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc. (Lydon, Tiffany) Modified on 12/20/2017 (lih).
December 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 208 REDACTED VERSION of #205 Letter, by Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc. (Lydon, Tiffany)
December 14, 2017 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #206 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Paul Foust. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 12/14/2017. (lih)
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- re #201 Joint MOTION for Discovery Teleconference. The transcript of the 12/13/2017 teleconference shall serve as the order of the court. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 12/13/2017. (lih)
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sherry R. Fallon - Discovery Dispute Telephone Conference held on 12/13/2017. (Court Reporter T. Carroll (Hawkins Reporting).) (lih)
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORAL ORDER: The Oral Argument set for 10/26/2018 at 09:30 AM regarding motion(s) for summary judgment is cancelled and will be rescheduled, if deemed necessary, by further order of the court. Signed by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon on 12/13/17. (Brunswick, Amy)
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 206 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Paul Foust - filed by Alcoa Inc.. (Fineman, Steven)
December 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 205 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Tiffany Geyer Lydon regarding the Pechiney Parties' Response to Century's December 1, 2017 Letter Regarding Discovery Disputes - re #204 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lydon, Tiffany)
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 204 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Mary F. Dugan regarding Regarding Discovery Dispute. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-13, #2 Exhibits 14-26)(Dugan, Mary)
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER- re #202 Memorandum Opinion granting #143 MOTION for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 12/1/2017. (lih)
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 202 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 12/1/2017. (lih)
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 201 Joint MOTION for Teleconference to Resolve Discovery Dispute - filed by Century Aluminum Company. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Dugan, Mary) Modified on 12/1/2017 (lih).
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #201 Joint MOTION for Teleconference to Resolve Discovery Dispute. A Telephone Conference is set for 12/13/2017 at 02:00 PM before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. Counsel for the century aluminum conmpany shall initiate the call to 302-573-4557. In preparation for this hearing the parties shall follow the Discovery Matters and Disputes procedure as set forth in the Order regarding discovery matters available at www.ded.uscourts.gov/judge/magistrate-judge-sherry-r-fallon. Set Deadlines: (Moving Submission due by no later than 3:00 PM TODAY, Responsive submission due by no later than 3:00 PM on 12/8/2017. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 12/1/2017. (lih)
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 200 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoena to Testify to Pierre Juliot filed by Alcoa Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Subpoena to Testify to Pierre Juliot)(Haynes, Christine)
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 199 NOTICE OF SERVICE of The Pechiney Parties' Objections to Alcoa Inc.'s Rule 45 Subpoenas filed by Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc.(Lydon, Tiffany)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 198 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoena on Fruitland Owner LLC filed by Alcoa Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Haynes, Christine)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 197 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoena on The City of Vernon filed by Alcoa Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Haynes, Christine)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 196 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoena on AMEC Foster Wheeler PLC filed by Alcoa Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Haynes, Christine)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 195 NOTICE of Service of Subpoena on Boyle at 54th, LLC by Alcoa Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Haynes, Christine)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 194 NOTICE of Service of Subpoena on American Integrated Services, Inc. by Alcoa Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Haynes, Christine)
November 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 193 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Pechiney Parties on January 9, 10 and 12, 2018 at 9:00 a.m. filed by Century Aluminum Company.(Dugan, Mary)
November 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 192 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Alcoa Inc. on December 20, 2017 at 9:00 a.m. filed by Century Aluminum Company.(Dugan, Mary)
November 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 191 NOTICE to Take Deposition of American Integrated Services, Inc. on December 8, 2017 at 10:00 a.m. filed by Century Aluminum Company.(Dugan, Mary)
November 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 190 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Fruitland Owner LLC on December 12, 2017 at 10:00 a.m. filed by Century Aluminum Company.(Dugan, Mary)
November 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 189 NOTICE to Take Deposition of AMEC Foster Wheeler on January 29, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. filed by Century Aluminum Company.(Dugan, Mary)
November 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 188 NOTICE to Take Deposition of California DTSC on December 18, 2017 at 10:00 a.m. filed by Century Aluminum Company.(Dugan, Mary)
November 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 187 NOTICE to Take Deposition of The City of Vernon on December 15, 2017 at 10:00 a.m. filed by Century Aluminum Company.(Dugan, Mary)
November 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 186 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Boyle At 54th, LLC on December 11, 2017 at 10:00 a.m. filed by Century Aluminum Company.(Dugan, Mary)
November 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 185 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Xebec Realty Partners on December 7, 2017 at 10:00 a.m. filed by Century Aluminum Company.(Dugan, Mary)
November 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 184 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoena to Xebec Realty Partners filed by Alcoa Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Haynes, Christine)
November 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 183 NOTICE of Subpoena to AMEC Foster Wheeler by Alcoa Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Fineman, Steven)
November 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 182 NOTICE of Subpoena to American Integrated Services, Inc. by Alcoa Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Fineman, Steven)
November 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 181 NOTICE of Subpoena to The City of Vernon by Alcoa Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Fineman, Steven)
November 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 180 NOTICE of Subpoena to Boyle at 54th by Alcoa Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Fineman, Steven)
November 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 179 NOTICE of Subpoena to Fruitland Owner LLC by Alcoa Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Fineman, Steven)
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 178 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Notice of Subpoena and Subpoena filed by Century Aluminum Company.(Dugan, Mary)
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 177 NOTICE of Appearance by Christine Dealy Haynes on behalf of Alcoa Inc. (Haynes, Christine)
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 176 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Selena E. Molina by Alcoa Inc. (Molina, Selena)
October 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 175 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) The Pechiney Parties' Responses to Century Aluminum Company's Requests for Admission to the Pechiney Parties; (2) The Pechiney Parties' Responses to Century Aluminum Company's Second Set of Interrogatories to the Pechiney Parties; and (3) The Pechiney Parties' Responses to Century Aluminum Company's Third Set of Interrogatories to the Pechiney Parties filed by Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc.(Lydon, Tiffany)
October 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 174 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Alcoa Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Century Aluminum Company's First Set of Interrogatories filed by Alcoa Inc..(Fineman, Steven)
October 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 173 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Alcoa Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Century Aluminum Company's Requests for Admission filed by Alcoa Inc..(Fineman, Steven)
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 172 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Notice of Subpoenas filed by Century Aluminum Company.(Dugan, Mary)
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- re #168 Stipulated Scheduling Order. Set SCHEDULING ORDER deadlines: Fact Discovery completed by 2/2/2018., Opening Expert Reports due by 3/16/2018., Rebuttal Expert Reports due by 5/25/2018., Expert Discovery due by 7/27/2018., Status Report, limited to no more than four pages, due by 6/12/2018., A Status Teleconference is set for 6/19/2018 at 11:00 AM before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. Counsel for Plaintiff shall organize and initiate the teleconference to the Chambers of Sherry R. Fallon at 302-573-4557. If the District Judge permits oral argument, the court shall hear oral argument on summary judgment on 1/11/2019, subject to the availability of the District Judge. The time and location of oral argument, if permitted, will be provided by the court closer to the hearing date. A Pretrial Conference is set for 5/13/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6C before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. A Jury Trial is set for 6/17/2019 at 09:30 AM before Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 9/20/2017. (lih)
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sherry R. Fallon - Telephone Conference held on 9/20/2017. (Court Reporter T. Carroll (Hawkins Reporting).) (lih)
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 171 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Notice of Subpoenas filed by Century Aluminum Company.(Dugan, Mary)
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 170 NOTICE OF SERVICE of the Pechiney Parties' Objections to Century Aluminum Company's Rule 45 Subpoenas filed by Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc.(Lydon, Tiffany)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 169 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Century Aluminum Company's Supplemental Objections and Responses to Pechiney Parties' Requests for Admission filed by Century Aluminum Company.(Dugan, Mary)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- re #168 Joint STIPULATION Amending the Case Schedule. A Status Telephone Conference is set for 9/20/2017 at 02:00 PM before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. Counsel for the plaintiff shall initiate the call to 302-573-4557. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 9/13/2017. (lih)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Jennifer A. Miller for Century Aluminum Company added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (lmm)
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 168 Joint STIPULATION Amending the Case Schedule re #123 Scheduling Order by Century Aluminum Company. (Dugan, Mary) Modified on 9/8/2017 (lih).
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 167 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Nicole E. Wrigley and Jennifer A. Miller - filed by Century Aluminum Company. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Nicole E. Wrigley, #2 Certification of Jennifer A. Miller)(Dugan, Mary)
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #167 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Nicole E. Wrigley and Jennifer A. Miller. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 9/7/2017. (lih)
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order SECOND NOTICE: Per Magistrate Judge Fallon's Standing Order Regarding Courtesy Copies, which requires two (2) courtesy copies of all briefs and two (2) copies of any other document filed in support of any briefs (i.e., appendices, exhibits, declarations, affidavits etc.), please submit to the Clerk's Office two copied of D.I. #151 . (lih)
August 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 166 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Notice of Subpoenas filed by Century Aluminum Company.(Dugan, Mary)
August 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 165 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Second Supplemental Disclosures of the Pechiney Parties filed by Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc.(Lydon, Tiffany)
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order REQUEST: Per Magistrate Judge Fallon's Standing Order Regarding Courtesy Copies, which requires two (2) courtesy copies of all briefs and two (2) copies of any other document filed in support of any briefs (i.e., appendices, exhibits, declarations, affidavits etc.), please submit to the Clerk's Office two copies of D.I. #143 , #144 , #151 and #153 . (lih)
August 23, 2017 Opinion or Order MOTIONS REFERRED: #143 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Cross-Claim against Century Aluminum Company Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Brunswick, Amy)
August 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Steven Grimes for Century Aluminum Company added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ceg)
August 21, 2017 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #164 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Steven Grimes. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 8/21/2017. (lih)
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 164 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Steven Grimes - filed by Century Aluminum Company. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Steven Grimes to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice)(Dugan, Mary)
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 163 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Century Aluminum Company's Third Set of Interrogatories to the Pechiney Parties filed by Century Aluminum Company.(Dugan, Mary)
August 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 162 NOTICE OF SERVICE of the Pechiney Parties' Objections and Responses to Alcoa Inc.'s Rule 30(b)(6) Notices of Deposition filed by Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc.(Lydon, Tiffany)
August 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 161 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Century Aluminum Companys Interrogatories and Requests for Admission to Alcoa Inc. filed by Century Aluminum Company.(Dugan, Mary)
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORAL ORDER - Pursuant to the filing of this case, the Court issues the following order: This case shall be immediately referred to Magistrate Judge Sherry R. Fallon. Magistrate Judge Fallon shall issue a scheduling order when appropriate. Magistrate Judge Fallon shall handle all dispositive and nondispositive matters on all issues, except for summary judgments, Daubert motions and pretrial motions in limine. On all dispositive matters, the magistrate judge shall issue a report and recommendation. The parties have the right to file objections to the report and recommendation, or in the case of nondispositive matters, file an appeal of the magistrate judges order, and the same shall b e decided by the undersigned. The magistrate judge shall likewise handle all discovery matters, scheduling, and pretrial conferences. If the parties believe the magistrate judge has a conflict of interest with this case, the parties shall so notify the Court. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon on 8/9/2017. (Lawrence, Tiwauna)
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 159 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Century Aluminum Company's Second Set of Interrogatories to the Pechiney Parties and Century Aluminum Company's Second Set of Requests for Admission to the Pechiney Parties filed by Century Aluminum Company.(Dugan, Mary)
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 158 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Alcoa Inc.'s Responses to Pechiney Parties' Requests for Admissions filed by Alcoa Inc..(Molina, Selena)
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 157 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Alcoa Inc.'s Resposnes to Pechiney Parties' Interrogatories (Part Two) filed by Alcoa Inc..(Molina, Selena)
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 156 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Century Aluminum Company's Objections and Responses to the Pechiney Parties' Second Set of Interrogatories and Century Aluminum Company's Objections and Responses to the Pechiney Parties' Second Requests for Admission filed by Century Aluminum Company.(Dugan, Mary)
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 155 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Century Aluminum Company's Objections and Responses to Pechiney Parties' Notice of Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition filed by Century Aluminum Company.(Dugan, Mary)
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 154 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Century Aluminum Company's Objections and Responses to Alcoa, Inc.'s Notice of Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition filed by Century Aluminum Company.(Dugan, Mary)
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: Removed Notice of Service due to pages missing to be ref-filed per request of filer. (rwc)
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Case Reassigned to Judge Joseph F. Bataillon of the District of Nebraska (in lieu of Vacant Judgeship). Please include the initials of the Judge (JFB) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 153 REPLY BRIEF re #143 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Cross-Claim against Century Aluminum Company filed by Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc. (Lydon, Tiffany) Modified on 7/24/2017 (lih).
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 152 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Notice of Subpoenas filed by Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc.(Lydon, Tiffany)
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #143 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Cross-Claim filed by Century Aluminum Company.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 7/21/2017. (Dugan, Mary) Modified on 7/18/2017 (lih).
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 150 NOTICE of Appearance by Selena E. Molina on behalf of Alcoa Inc. (Molina, Selena)
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 149 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Alcan Rolled Products-Ravenswood LLC, f/k/a Pechiney Rolled Products, LLC on August 16, 2017 filed by Alcoa Inc..(Fineman, Steven)
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 148 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Century Aluminum Company on August 15, 2017 filed by Alcoa Inc..(Fineman, Steven)
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 147 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Pechiney Cast Plate, Inc. on August 17, 2017 filed by Alcoa Inc..(Fineman, Steven)
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 146 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Pechiney Parties' Notice of Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition of Alcoa Inc. and Pechiney Parties' Notice of Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition of Century Aluminum Company filed by Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc.(Lydon, Tiffany)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 145 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Pechiney Parties' Requests for Admission to Alcoa, Inc.; (2) Pechiney Parties' Second Set of Interrogatories to Alcoa, Inc.; (3) Pechiney Parties' Requests for Admission to Century Aluminum Company; and (4) Pechiney Parties' Second Set of Interrogatories to Century Aluminum Company filed by Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc.(Lydon, Tiffany)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 144 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #143 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Cross-Claim against Century Aluminum Company filed by Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 7/14/2017. (Lydon, Tiffany) Modified on 6/30/2017 (lih).
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 143 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Cross-Claim against Century Aluminum Company - filed by Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Lydon, Tiffany) Modified on 6/30/2017 (lih).
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 142 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Notice of Subpoenas filed by Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc.(Lydon, Tiffany)
March 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 141 PROPOSED ORDER Protective Order by Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc. (Lydon, Tiffany)
March 10, 2017 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #141 Proposed Order filed by Pechiney Cast Plate Inc, Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 3/10/2017. (Polito, Rebecca)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 140 NOTICE OF SERVICE of The Pechiney Parties' Objections and Responses to Century Aluminum Company's Second Set of Requests for Production filed by Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc.(Lydon, Tiffany)
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 139 NOTICE OF SERVICE of The Pechiney Parties' Objections and Responses to Alcoa Inc.'s Second Requests for Production filed by Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc.(Lydon, Tiffany)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: on or before 12/4/17, counsel shall submit a joint status report to the court, limited to no more than four pages, that addresses the following: whether document and written discovery exchanges have been meaningful; whether depositions and fact discovery are completed pursuant to the scheduling order; and whether the parties anticipate the need to seek amendment of any deadlines for expert discovery in the current scheduling order. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 2/13/2017. (Polito, Rebecca)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sherry R. Fallon - Discovery Review Hearing held on 2/13/2017. (Court Reporter S. Ingram (Hawkins Reporting).) (Polito, Rebecca)
February 9, 2017 Opinion or Order CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Fallon for Mediation. Please see Standing Order dated January 20, 2016, regarding disclosure of confidential ADR communications. A link to the standing order is provided here for your convenience at # http://www.ded.uscourts.gov/general-orders/magistrate-judges-standing-order-adr-mediation (Polito, Rebecca)
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- Per the joint email request of counsel, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: the discovery review hearing set in this matter for 2/13/2017 is converted into a teleconference. Counsel for the plaintiff shall initiate the call to 302-573-4557. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that: client representatives are excused from participating in the discovery review teleconference. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 2/7/2017. (lih)
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #137 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for document discovery to February 28, 2017. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 2/7/2017. (lih)
February 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 138 Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Tiffany Geyer Lydon regarding joint submission from all parties pursuant to the Court's November 29, 2016 Order. (Lydon, Tiffany)
February 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 137 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for document discovery to February 28, 2017 - filed by Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc. (Lydon, Tiffany)
February 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 136 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Alcoa Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Century Aluminum Company's Second Request for Production filed by Alcoa Inc..(Fineman, Steven)
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 135 NOTICE of Service of Century Aluminum Company's Responses to Alcoa's Second Request for Production by Century Aluminum Company (Dugan, Mary)
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 134 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Alcoa Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Pechiney's Second Request for Production filed by Alcoa Inc..(Fineman, Steven)
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 133 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Century Aluminum Company's Responses to the Alcan Defendants' Second Request for the Production of Documents filed by Century Aluminum Company.(Dugan, Mary)
December 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 132 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Century Aluminum Company's Second Set of Requests for the Production of Documents to Alcoa Inc. filed by Century Aluminum Company.(Dugan, Mary)
December 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 131 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Century Aluminum Company's Second Set of Requests for the Production of Documents to the Alcan Defendants filed by Century Aluminum Company.(Dugan, Mary)
December 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 130 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Alcoa Inc.'s Second Requests for Production to Century Aluminum Company filed by Alcoa Inc..(Fineman, Steven)
December 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 129 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Alcoa Inc.'s Second Requests for Production to Alcan Rolled Products-Ravenswood LLC, f/k/a Pechiney Rolled Products, LLC, and Pechiney Cast Plate, Inc. filed by Alcoa Inc..(Fineman, Steven)
November 29, 2016 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- Pursuant to the joint request of counsel, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: the discovery review hearing originally set in this matter for today is RESCHEDULED to 2/13/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6C before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that: on or before 2/6/2017, counsel shall submit a joint letter, limited to no more than four pages, that addresses the following: whether the initial exchanges have been meaningful; whether discovery of paper and electronic documents is being completed in accordance with the scheduling order; whether the parties anticipate the need to seek amendment of any deadlines for fact discovery in the current scheduling order. Order by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 11/29/2016. (lih)
November 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 128 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Pechiney Parties' Second Request for Production to Alcoa, Inc. and Pechiney Parties' Second Request for Production to Century Aluminum Company filed by Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc.(Lydon, Tiffany)
November 21, 2016 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- The discovery review hearing scheduled for 11/29/2016 at 3:00 p.m. is CANCELED and will be rescheduled at a later date. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 11/21/2016. (Polito, Rebecca) Modified on 11/29/2016 (lih).
November 21, 2016 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- The 11/22/2016 deadline for submission of the status report is hereby postponed to a date to be determined. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 11/21/2016. (Polito, Rebecca) Modified on 11/29/2016 (lih).
August 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 127 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Supplemental Disclosures of the Pechiney Parties filed by Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc.(Lydon, Tiffany)
August 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 126 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Rule 26(a)(1) Supplemental Disclosures filed by Alcoa Inc..(Fineman, Steven)
August 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 125 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Century Aluminum Company's Supplemental Initial Disclosures filed by Century Aluminum Company.(Dugan, Mary)
August 8, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER- re #124 Order. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: on or before 11/22/2016, counsel shall submit a joint letter, limited to no more than four pages, that addresses the following: whether the initial exchanges have been meaningful; whether discovery of paper and electronic documents is being completed in accordance with the scheduling order; whether the parties anticipate the need to seek amendment of any deadlines for fact discovery in the current scheduling order. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 8/8/2016. (lih)
August 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER- A Discovery Review Hearing is set for 11/29/2016 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 6C before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 8/2/2016. (lih)
August 1, 2016 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: Removed MPT Mediation Flag. The matter should go to Judge Fallon for mediation. (cak)
July 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 123 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case referred to the Magistrate Judge for the purpose of exploring ADR. Case referred to the Magistrate Judge for discovery. Joinder of Parties due by 6/30/2017. Amended Pleadings due by 6/30/2017. Fact Discovery completed by 9/28/2017. Expert Discovery due by 3/30/2018. Dispositive Motions due by 5/31/2018. Answering Brief due 7/31/2018. Reply Brief due 8/31/2018. An Oral Argument is set for 10/26/2018 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson. A Final Pretrial Conference is set for 1/15/2019 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson. A Jury Trial is set for 2/19/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 7/25/2016. (nmfn)
July 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sue L. Robinson - Scheduling Conference held on 7/25/2016. (Court Reporter not present.) (nmfn)
July 25, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #120 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Scott P. Glauberman, Stephanie B. Sebor, and Thomas G. Weber filed by Century Aluminum Company. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 7/25/2016. (nmfn)
July 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 122 PROPOSED ORDER Case Scheduling Order by Alcoa Inc.. (Fineman, Steven)
July 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Ryan D. Fischbach, Sonja A. Inglin, John F. Cermak, Jr. for Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (klc)
July 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Lora M. Reece for Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (dmp, )
July 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney John D. Parker for Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (dmp, )
July 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 121 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Robert M. Howard, James R. Barrett, Mark A. Miler, and the Law Firm of Latham & Watkins LLP as co-counsel. Reason for request: No longer representing defendant. (Dugan, Mary)
July 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 120 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Scott P. Glauberman, Stephanie B. Sebor, and Thomas G. Weber - filed by Century Aluminum Company. (Dugan, Mary)
July 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 119 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Jenner & Block LLP as co-counsel.. (Lydon, Tiffany)
July 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 118 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John D. Parker, John F. Cermak, Jr., Sonja A. Inglin, Lora M. Reece and Ryan D. Fischbach - filed by Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc. (Lydon, Tiffany)
July 19, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #118 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John D. Parker, John F. Cermak, Jr., Sonja A. Inglin, Lora M. Reece and Ryan D. Fischbach filed by Pechiney Cast Plate Inc, Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 7/19/2016. (fms)
July 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney David B. Sadwick,Rene P. Tatro for Alcoa Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (dmp, )
June 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER REOPENING CASE, Order Setting Telephonic Scheduling Conference:( A Scheduling Conference is set for 7/25/2016 at 04:00 PM before Judge Sue L. Robinson). Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 6/30/2016. (nmfn)
June 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 116 Joint STATUS REPORT by Alcoa Inc.. (Fineman, Steven)
December 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 115 Joint STATUS REPORT and Request to Continue Stay by Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc. (Lydon, Tiffany)
July 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 114 Joint STATUS REPORT and REQUEST TO CONTINUE STAY by Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc. (Lydon, Tiffany)
December 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 113 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Christian Douglas Wright as Attorney by Century Aluminum Company (Wright, Christian)
June 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER. The case is stayed and administratively closed until further order of the court. The parties shall promptly notify the court when the above proceedings have been resolved so that the case may be reopened and other appropriate action may be taken.(CASE CLOSED). Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 6/22/2012. (fms)
April 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 111 Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Steven J. Fineman regarding Joint Status Report. (Fineman, Steven)
March 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 110 STATUS REPORT ORDER Status Report due by 4/23/2012. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 3/23/2012. (nmf)
September 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 109 Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Steven J. Fineman regarding joint status report. (Fineman, Steven)
September 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 108 Order Setting Teleconference: Telephone Conference set for 9/14/2010 at 2:00 PM before Judge Mary Pat Thynge to discuss ADR. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 9/1/2010. (cak)
August 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 107 Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Steven J. Fineman regarding Joint Status Report and Update. (Fineman, Steven)
August 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. ORDER that the reference to Judge Stark pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b) is hereby withdrawn. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the above captioned case is referred to Judge Thynge, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b), for purposes of exploring ADR. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 8/24/2010. (nmf)
June 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 105 Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Steven J. Fineman regarding Joint Status Report - re #104 Status Report Order. (Fineman, Steven)
May 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 104 STATUS REPORT ORDER Status Report due by 6/14/2010. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 5/12/2010. (nmf)
April 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 103 NOTICE of Withdrawal of J. Michael Showalter by Alcoa Inc. (Fineman, Steven)
July 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 102 Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Steven J. Fineman regarding joint status report - re #101 Status Report Order. (Fineman, Steven)
June 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 101 STATUS REPORT ORDER Status Report due by 7/9/2009. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 6/9/2009. (nmf)
October 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Case Stayed per the "So Ordered" of D.I. #100 . (nmf)
October 7, 2008 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #100 Stipulation Vacating all dates set forth in the Scheduling Order dated 09/18/2007. ORDER- terminating Scheduling Order Deadlines. (SEE STIPULATION FOR FURTHER DEATAILS.) Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 10/7/2008. (lid)
October 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 100 STIPULATION To Amend Scheduling Order re #97 Order Setting Mediation Conferences, #96 Stipulation by Alcoa Inc.. (Fineman, Steven)
October 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 99 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel by Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc (Day, John)
June 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER CANCELING the Mediation Conference set for 7/9/2008. ( Please see Order for complete details related to mediation statements and further requirements ). Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 6/17/2008. (rpg)
May 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER Setting Mediation Conference: Telephone Conference set for 6/17/2008 10:00 AM before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Mediation Conference set for 7/9/2008 10:00 AM before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Mediation Conference originally set for 6/17/2008 at 10:00 AM is hereby CANCELED. Please see Order for further details. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/5/2008. (rpg)
April 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 96 STIPULATION Amend Scheduling Order by Pechiney Rolled Products, LLC, Alcoa Inc., Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc, Century Aluminum Company. (Fineman, Steven)
April 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 95 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Robyn L. Ginsberg of Latham & Watkins LLP as co-counsel.. (Dugan, Mary)
March 4, 2008 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #93 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David Craig Landin filed by Alcoa Inc. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 3/4/2008. (nfn)
March 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER Setting Mediation Conference:Mediation Conference set for 5/21/2008 11:00 AM in Courtroom 2A before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/3/2008. (rpg)
February 27, 2008 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #92 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Rene P. Tatro filed by Alcoa Inc. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 2/27/2008. (nfn)
February 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 93 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David Craig Landin - filed by Alcoa Inc.. (Fineman, Steven)
February 13, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 92 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Rene P. Tatro - filed by Alcoa Inc.. (Fineman, Steven)
February 13, 2008 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #90 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John Daniel Epps of Hunton & Williams, LLP and David B. Sadwick of Tattro, Tekosky, Sadwick, LLP filed by Alcoa Inc. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 2/13/2008. (nfn)
February 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER Setting Mediation Conference: Telephone Conference set for 2/25/2008 09:00 AM before Honorable Leonard P. Stark. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 2/11/2008. (rpg)
February 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 90 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John Daniel Epps of Hunton & Williams, LLP and David B. Sadwick of Tattro, Tekosky, Sadwick, LLP - filed by Alcoa Inc.. (Fineman, Steven)
December 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 89 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Objections and Responses to Century's First Requests for Production by Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc.(Lydon, Tiffany)
December 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 88 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Objections and Responses to Century's First Set of Interrogatories by Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc.(Lydon, Tiffany)
December 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 87 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Alcoa Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Century Aluminum Company's First Set of Interrogatories re #85 Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) by Alcoa Inc.. Related document: #85 Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) filed by Century Aluminum Company.(Fineman, Steven)
December 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 86 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Response of Alcoa Inc. to Century Aluminum Century's First Requests for Production to Alcoa Inc. re #85 Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) by Alcoa Inc.. Related document: #85 Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) filed by Century Aluminum Company.(Fineman, Steven)
November 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 85 NOTICE of (1) Defendant Century Aluminum Company's First Set of Requests for the Production of Documents to Alcan Rolled Products-Ravenswood LLC and Pechiney Cast Plate, Inc., (2) Defendant Century Aluminum Company's First Set of Interrogatories to Alcan Rolled Products-Ravenswood LLC and Pechiney Cast Plate, Inc., (3) Defendant Century Aluminum Company's First Set of Requests for the Production of Documents to Alcoa, Inc., (4) Defendant Century Aluminum Company's First Set of Interrogatories to Alcoa, Inc., and (5) this Notice of Service by Century Aluminum Company (Dugan, Mary)
November 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 84 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendant Century Aluminum Company's Objections and Responses to Alcan Rolled Products-Ravenswood LLC's and Pechiney Cast Plate, Inc.'s First Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and (2) Defendant Century Aluminum Company's Objections and Responses to Alcan Rolled Products-Ravenswood LLC's and Pechiney Cast Plate, Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories by Century Aluminum Company.(Dugan, Mary)
November 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 83 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Response Of Alcoa Inc. To Alcan Rolled Products-Ravenswood LLC And Pechiney Cast Plate, Inc.'s First Requests For Production To Aloca Inc. re #77 Notice of Service by Alcoa Inc.. Related document: #77 Notice of Service filed by Pechiney Cast Plate Inc, Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC.(Fineman, Steven)
November 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 82 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Alcoa Inc.'s Objections And Responses To Alcan Rolled Products-Ravenswood LLC And Pechiney Cast Plate, Inc.'s First Set Of Interrogatories re #76 Notice of Service by Alcoa Inc.. Related document: #76 Notice of Service filed by Pechiney Cast Plate Inc, Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC.(Fineman, Steven)
October 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 81 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Electronically Stored Information Report by Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc.(Day, John)
October 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 80 NOTICE of Service of Century Aluminum Company's Supplemental Disclosures Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(e) by Century Aluminum Company (Dugan, Mary)
October 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 79 NOTICE OF SERVICE of First Requests for Production to Century Aluminum Company by Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc.(Day, John)
October 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 78 NOTICE OF SERVICE of First Set of Interrogatories to Century Aluminum Company by Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc.(Day, John)
October 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 77 NOTICE OF SERVICE of First Requests for Production to Alcoa Inc. by Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc.(Day, John)
October 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 76 NOTICE OF SERVICE of First Set of Interrogatories to Alcoa Inc. by Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc.(Day, John)
October 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 75 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Century Aluminum Company's Objections and Responses to Plaintiff Alcoa, Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories, (2) Century Aluminum Company's Objections and Responses to Plaintiff Alcoa, Inc.'s First Set of Requests for the Production of Documents re #59 Notice of Service, #60 Notice of Service by Century Aluminum Company. Related document: #59 Notice of Service filed by Alcoa Inc., #60 Notice of Service filed by Alcoa Inc..(Dugan, Mary)
October 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER Setting Mediation Conferences: Mediation Conference set for 2/25/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2A before Honorable Leonard P. Stark. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/2/07. (rpg)
October 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Reset Hearings: Mediation Conference set for 2/25/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2A before Honorable Leonard P. Stark. (rpg)
September 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 73 Order Setting Teleconference: Telephone Conference set for 10/2/2007 10:00 AM before Honorable Leonard P. Stark. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/18/07. (rpg)
September 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 72 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case referred to the Magistrate Judge for the purpose of exploring ADR. Joinder of Parties due by 12/15/2007.,Amended Pleadings due by 12/15/2007.,Discovery due by 7/25/2008.,Dispositive Motions due by 9/8/2008.,Motions in Limine due by 2/16/2009.,Responses to Motions in Limine due by 2/23/2009.,Answering Brief due 10/8/2008.,Reply Brief due 10/22/2008.,Pretrial Conference set for 3/2/2009 04:30 PM in Courtroom 6B before Honorable Sue L. Robinson.,Jury Trial set for 3/23/2009 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6B before Honorable Sue L. Robinson. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 9/18/07. (rlp)
September 18, 2007 Opinion or Order CASE REFERRED to Mediation. (rpg)
September 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 71 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Pechiney Cast Plate, Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Alcoa's First Requests for Production by Pechiney Cast Plate Inc.(Lydon, Tiffany)
September 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 70 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Pechiney Cast Plate, Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Alcoa's First Set of Interrogatories by Pechiney Cast Plate Inc.(Lydon, Tiffany)
September 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 69 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Alcan Rolled Products-Ravenswood LLC's Objections and Responses to Alcoa's First Requests for Production by Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC.(Lydon, Tiffany)
September 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 68 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Alcan Rolled Products-Ravenswood LLC's Objections and Responses to Alcoa's First Set of Interrogatories by Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC.(Lydon, Tiffany)
September 14, 2007 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #65 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Sarah Hardgrove-Koleno and Steven M. Siros filed by Pechiney Cast Plate Inc, Pechiney Rolled Products, LLC, Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 9/14/07. (rlp)
September 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 67 Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Steven J. Fineman regarding enclosing final proposed Scheduling Order - re #66 Proposed Order. (Fineman, Steven)
September 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 66 PROPOSED ORDER re: Scheduling Order re Scheduling Conference on August 2, 2007 by Alcoa Inc.. (Fineman, Steven)
September 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Sarah Hardgrove-Koleno and Steven M. Siros - filed by Pechiney Rolled Products, LLC, Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc. (Day, John)
September 4, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ANSWER to Counterclaim by Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc.(Lydon, Tiffany)
August 31, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 63 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures by Pechiney Rolled Products, LLC, Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc.(Day, John)
August 31, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 62 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures by Alcoa Inc..(Fineman, Steven)
August 31, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 61 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Century Aluminum Company's Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(1) by Century Aluminum Company.(Dugan, Mary)
August 24, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 60 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Alcoa Inc.'s First Requests for Production to Century Aluminum Company re #1 Complaint, by Alcoa Inc.. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Alcoa Inc..(Fineman, Steven)
August 24, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 59 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Alcoa Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories to Century Aluminum Company re #1 Complaint, by Alcoa Inc.. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Alcoa Inc..(Fineman, Steven)
August 23, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ANSWER to Counterclaim Answer and Affirmative Defenses of Alcoa Inc. to Century Aluminum Company's Counterclaims and Cross-Claims by Alcoa Inc..(Fineman, Steven)
August 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ANSWER to Counterclaim of Century Aluminum Company, ANSWER to Crossclaim of Century Aluminum Company by Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc.(Day, John)
August 16, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 56 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Alcoa Inc.'s First Requests for Production to Pechiney Cast Plate, Inc. re #50 Letter, #1 Complaint, by Alcoa Inc.. Related document: #50 Letter, #1 Complaint, filed by Alcoa Inc..(Fineman, Steven)
August 16, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 55 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Alcoa Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories to Alcan Rolled Products-Ravenswood LLC re #50 Letter, #1 Complaint, by Alcoa Inc.. Related document: #50 Letter, #1 Complaint, filed by Alcoa Inc..(Fineman, Steven)
August 16, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 54 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Alcoa Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories to Pechiney Cast Plate, Inc. re #50 Letter, #1 Complaint, by Alcoa Inc.. Related document: #50 Letter, #1 Complaint, filed by Alcoa Inc..(Fineman, Steven)
August 16, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 53 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Alcoa's First Requests for Production of Documents Directed to Alcan Rolled Products-Ravenswood LLC re #50 Letter, #1 Complaint, by Alcoa Inc.. Related document: #50 Letter, #1 Complaint, filed by Alcoa Inc..(Fineman, Steven)
August 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ANSWER to Counterclaim Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims of Alcoa Inc. to Alcan Defendants' Counterclaims and Cross-Claims, COUNTERCLAIM against Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc by Alcoa Inc..(Fineman, Steven)
August 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ANSWER to Crossclaim Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims of Century Aluminum Company to Alcan Rolled Products-Ravenswood LLC and Pechiney Cast Plate Inc.'s Cross-Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc by Century Aluminum Company.(Dugan, Mary)
August 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sue L. Robinson : Scheduling TeleConference held on 8/2/2007. (Court Reporter n/a.) (rld) Modified on 8/2/2007 (rld, ). Counsel to submit the final scheduling order.
August 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Steven J. Fineman regarding Proposed Scheduling Order. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fineman, Steven)
July 31, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, CROSSCLAIM against Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc, COUNTERCLAIM against Alcoa Inc. by Century Aluminum Company.(Wright, Christian)
July 23, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, CROSSCLAIM against Century Aluminum Company, COUNTERCLAIM against Alcoa Inc. by Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc.(Day, John)
July 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting D.I. 12-Alcan's motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction and denying D.I. 19 Century's motion to dismiss for failure to join a party. Attorney Steven J. Balick and Steven J. Fineman terminated. Alcan Inc. terminated. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 7/17/07. (rld)
July 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 7/17/07. (rld)
July 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 7/17/07. (rld)
July 16, 2007 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #44 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Mark A. Miller filed by Century Aluminum Company. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 7/16/07. (rld)
July 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Mark A. Miller - filed by Century Aluminum Company. (Attachments: #1 Pro Hac Certification)(Dugan, Mary)
July 3, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER Setting Hearings Scheduling TeleConference set for 8/2/2007 09:30 AM before Honorable Sue L. Robinson. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 7/3/07. (rld)
July 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MEMORANDUM ORDER, Motions terminated: denying #14 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Central District of California filed by Pechiney Cast Plate Inc, Alcan Inc., Pechiney Rolled Products, LLC, Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC. Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC answer due 7/23/2006; Pechiney Cast Plate Inc answer due 7/23/2006. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 7/2/07. (rld)
March 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 41 REPLY BRIEF re #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to Join a Party Century Aluminum Company's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Join a Party Under Rule 19 filed by Century Aluminum Company. (Wright, Christian)
February 23, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 40 DECLARATION of LEONARD GROSSBERG re #14 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Central District of California by Alcan Inc., Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc. (rld)
February 23, 2007 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #39 Stipulation permitting ALCAN defts. to suppl. the record on their motion to transfer, filed by Pechiney Cast Plate Inc, Alcan Inc., Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 2/21/07. (rld)
February 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STIPULATION and Order Permitting the Alcan Defendants to Supplement the Record on Their Motion to Transfer Venue by Alcan Inc., Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc. (Day, John) Additional attachment(s) added on 2/21/2007 (rld, ). Additional attachment(s) added on 2/21/2007 (rld, ).
February 15, 2007 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #38 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Harry M. Johnson, III and J. Michael Showalter of Hunton & Williams LLP filed by Alcoa Inc. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 2/15/07. (rld)
February 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Harry M. Johnson, III and J. Michael Showalter of Hunton & Williams LLP - filed by Alcoa Inc.. (Fineman, Steven)
February 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 37 DECLARATION re #36 Answering Brief in Opposition, Declaration of J. Michael Showalter in Support of Alcoa's Answering Brief in Opposition to Century Aluminum Company's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Join a Party Under Rule 19 by Alcoa Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit s 1 and 2#2 Exhibit s 3 through 9)(Fineman, Steven)
February 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to Join a Party Century Aluminum Company's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Join a Party Under Rule 19 filed by Alcoa Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 2/23/2007. (Fineman, Steven)
January 12, 2007 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #35 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Plaintiff to file and serve its answering brief in response to Century Aluminum Company's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Join a Party Under Rule 19 to February 12, 2007 filed by Alcoa Inc., Ret Briefing Schedule: Answering Brief due 2/12/2007.Reply Brief due 3/8/2007. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 1/12/07. (rld)
January 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 35 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Plaintiff to file and serve its answering brief in response to Century Aluminum Company's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Join a Party Under Rule 19 to February 12, 2007 - filed by Alcoa Inc.. (Fineman, Steven)
December 20, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 34 REPLY BRIEF re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Person filed by Pechiney Rolled Products, LLC, Alcan Inc., Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc. (Lydon, Tiffany)
December 20, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 33 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Objections and Responses to Alcoa's First Request for Production of Documents Regarding Jurisdiction by Pechiney Rolled Products, LLC, Alcan Inc., Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc.(Lydon, Tiffany)
December 20, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 32 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Objections and Responses to Alcoa's First Set of Interrogatories Regarding Jurisdiction by Pechiney Rolled Products, LLC, Alcan Inc., Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc.(Lydon, Tiffany)
December 20, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 31 REPLY BRIEF re #14 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Central District of California filed by Pechiney Rolled Products, LLC, Alcan Inc., Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc. (Lydon, Tiffany)
December 19, 2006 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #30 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME within which Plaintiff shall file and serve its answering brief in response to Century Aluminum Company's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Join a Party to January 12, 2007 filed by Alcoa Inc., reSet Briefing Schedule: Answering Brief due 1/12/2007.Reply Brief due 2/5/2007. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 12/19/06. (rld)
December 15, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME within which Plaintiff shall file and serve its answering brief in response to Century Aluminum Company's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Join a Party to January 12, 2007 - filed by Alcoa Inc.. (Fineman, Steven)
December 15, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NOTICE of Change of Address by Steven J. Balick (Balick, Steven)
December 7, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 28 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Alcoa Inc.'s First Request For The Production Of Documents To The Alcan Defendants Regarding Jurisdiction by Alcoa Inc..(Fineman, Steven)
December 7, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Alco Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories To The Alcan Defendants Regarding Jurisdiction by Alcoa Inc..(Fineman, Steven)
December 5, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 26 DECLARATION re #25 Answering Brief in Opposition to Motion to Transfer Venue and Enlarge Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead [James J. Reardon] by Alcoa Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Fineman, Steven)
December 5, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Central District of California filed by Alcoa Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 12/15/2006. (Fineman, Steven)
December 5, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 24 AFFIDAVIT of James J. Reardon re #23 Answering Brief in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Alcoa Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1#2 Exhibit 2 - 6)(Fineman, Steven)
December 5, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Person filed by Alcoa Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 12/15/2006. (Fineman, Steven)
November 13, 2006 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #22 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to file and serve answering brief in response to Century Aluminum Company's motion to dismiss for failure to join a party under Rule 19 to December 19, 2006 filed by Alcoa Inc., ReSet Briefing Schedule: Answering Brief due 12/19/2006.Reply Brief due 1/12/2007. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 11/13/06. (rld)
November 8, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to file and serve answering brief in response to Century Aluminum Company's motion to dismiss for failure to join a party under Rule 19 to December 19, 2006 - filed by Alcoa Inc.. (Fineman, Steven)
October 31, 2006 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #18 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Robert M. Howard, James R. Barrett, and Robyn L. Ginsberg filed by Century Aluminum Company. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 10/31/06. (rld, )
October 27, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 21 DECLARATION re #20 Opening Brief in Support, Declaration of Christine F. Roussel in support of Motion to Dismiss under Rule 19 by Century Aluminum Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-C#2 Exhibit D, part 1#3 Exhibit D, part 2#4 Exhibits E & F#5 Exhibits G&H#6 Exhibits I-N#7 Certificate of Service)(Wright, Christian)
October 27, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 20 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to Join a Party Century Aluminum Company's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Join a Party Under Rule 19 filed by Century Aluminum Company.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 11/13/2006. (Attachments: # 1 Unreported Cases)(Wright, Christian)
October 27, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to Join a Party Century Aluminum Company's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Join a Party Under Rule 19 - filed by Century Aluminum Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service#2 Text of Proposed Order)(Wright, Christian)
October 27, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Robert M. Howard, James R. Barrett, and Robyn L. Ginsberg - filed by Century Aluminum Company. (Attachments: #1 Pro Hac Vice Certifications)(Dugan, Mary)
October 27, 2006 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #17 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME To file and serve its Answering Briefs in response to Alcan Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue and Enlarge Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead to Decem filed by Alcan Inc.,, Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC,, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc,, Pechiney Rolled Products, LLC,, ReSet Briefing Schedule: Answering Brief due 12/5/2006.Reply Brief due 12/20/2006. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 10/26/06. (rld, )
October 27, 2006 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: The unreported cases attached to D.I. 20 have been deleted from the docket; Please see "Important Filing Info." on Chief Judge Robinson's website: Counsel should not file copies of court decisions unless the case involves a pro se litigant or there are references in the brief to court decisions that are NOT electronically retrievable via Westlaw or Lexis. (fmt, )
October 26, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME To file and serve its Answering Briefs in response to Alcan Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue and Enlarge Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead to December 5, 2006 - filed by Pechiney Rolled Products, LLC, Alcan Inc., Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc. (Fineman, Steven)
October 25, 2006 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #16 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Carrie A. Fino filed by Alcan Inc.,, Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC,, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc,, Pechiney Rolled Products, LLC. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 10/24/06. (rld, )
October 20, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Carrie A. Fino - filed by Pechiney Rolled Products, LLC, Alcan Inc., Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc. (Balick, Steven)
October 16, 2006 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #11 Stipulation filed by Alcoa Inc.,, Century Aluminum Company,, Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Century Aluminum Company answer due 10/27/2006. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 10/13/06. (rld, )
October 13, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 15 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #14 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Central District of California filed by Pechiney Rolled Products, LLC, Alcan Inc., Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 10/27/2006. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C)(Balick, Steven)
October 13, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Central District of California and Enlarge Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead - filed by Pechiney Rolled Products, LLC, Alcan Inc., Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc. (Balick, Steven) Modified on 10/16/2006 (fmt, ).
October 13, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 13 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Person filed by Alcan Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 10/27/2006. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Balick, Steven)
October 13, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Person - filed by Alcan Inc.. (Balick, Steven)
October 11, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION Extending Date to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Complaint to October 27, 2006 re SO ORDERED, Set/Reset Answer Deadline(s) by Alcoa Inc., Century Aluminum Company. (Wright, Christian)
October 3, 2006 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #10 Second STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to respond to complaint to October 13, 2006 filed by Alcoa Inc.,, Alcan Inc.,, Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC,, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc,, Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Pechiney Rolled Products, LLC answer due 10/13/2006; Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC answer due 10/13/2006; Pechiney Cast Plate Inc answer due 10/13/2006. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 10/3/06. (rld, )
October 3, 2006 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Shelley Smith, Richard P. Steinken, and Shahid U. Haque filed by Alcan Inc.,, Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC,, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc,, Pechiney Rolled Products, LLC, . Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 10/03/06. (rld, )
October 3, 2006 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #9 Stipulation, filed by Alcoa Inc.,, Century Aluminum Company,, Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Century Aluminum Company answer due 10/13/2006. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 10/3/06. (rld, )
September 28, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Second STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to respond to complaint to October 13, 2006 - filed by Alcoa Inc., Alcan Inc., Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc. (Day, John)
September 26, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION to extend date to answer, move, or otherwise respond to complaint - extended to October 13, 2006 re SO ORDERED,, Set/Reset Answer Deadline(s), Set/Reset Answer Deadline(s), #1 Complaint, by Alcoa Inc., Century Aluminum Company. (Wright, Christian)
September 20, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Shelley Smith, Richard P. Steinken, and Shahid U. Haque - filed by Pechiney Rolled Products, LLC, Alcan Inc., Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc. (Balick, Steven)
August 24, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Century Aluminum Company. (Dugan, Mary)
August 21, 2006 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #4 Stipulation filed by Alcoa Inc.,, Century Aluminum Company,, Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Century Aluminum Company answer due 9/28/2006. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 8/16/06. (rld, )
August 21, 2006 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer Complaint to September 28, 2006 filed by Alcan Inc.,, Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC,, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc,, Pechiney Rolled Products, LLC,, Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Pechiney Rolled Products, LLC answer due 9/28/2006; Alcan Inc. answer due 9/28/2006; Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC answer due 9/28/2006; Pechiney Cast Plate Inc answer due 9/28/2006. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 8/16/06. (rld, )
August 11, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer Complaint to September 28, 2006 - filed by Pechiney Rolled Products, LLC, Alcan Inc., Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc. (Balick, Steven)
August 11, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven J. Balick on behalf of Pechiney Rolled Products, LLC, Alcan Inc., Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc (Balick, Steven)
August 11, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STIPULATION Extending Time for Century Aluminum Company to Respond to the Complaint to September 28, 2006 re #1 Complaint, by Alcoa Inc., Century Aluminum Company. (Wright, Christian)
August 2, 2006 Opinion or Order Case assigned to Judge Sue L. Robinson. Please include the initials of the Judge (SLR) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb, )
July 25, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Availability of a U.S. Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction (ead, )
July 25, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Alcoa Inc. (ead, )
July 25, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Alcan Inc., Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC, Pechiney Cast Plate Inc, Century Aluminum Company - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 144147.) - filed by Alcoa Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet #2 Acknowledgement of Consent Form)(ead, )
July 25, 2006 Opinion or Order Summons Issued as to Alcan Inc. on 7/25/2006; Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC on 7/25/2006; Pechiney Cast Plate Inc on 7/25/2006; Century Aluminum Company on 7/25/2006. (ead, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alcoa Inc. v. Alcan Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: Alcan Rolled Products- Ravenswood LLC
Represented By: John G. Day
Represented By: Steven J. Fineman
Represented By: Steven J. Balick
Represented By: Tiffany Geyer Lydon
Represented By: John F. Cermak, Jr.
Represented By: John D. Parker
Represented By: Lora M. Reece
Represented By: Robert C. Welsh
Represented By: Ryan D. Fischbach
Represented By: Sonja A. Inglin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Century Aluminum Company
Represented By: Mary Frances Dugan
Represented By: Christian Douglas Wright
Represented By: Elizabeth Deshaies
Represented By: Jennifer A. Miller
Represented By: Steven Grimes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pechiney Rolled Products LLC
Represented By: John G. Day
Represented By: Matthew D. Thurlow
Represented By: Lora M. Reece
Represented By: Robert C. Welsh
Represented By: John D. Parker
Represented By: Steven J. Fineman
Represented By: Ryan D. Fischbach
Represented By: Sonja A. Inglin
Represented By: Steven J. Balick
Represented By: Tiffany Geyer Lydon
Represented By: John F. Cermak, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alcan Inc.
Represented By: Steven J. Fineman
Represented By: Steven J. Balick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Pechiney Cast Plate Inc
Represented By: John G. Day
Represented By: Steven J. Fineman
Represented By: Steven J. Balick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Alcoa Inc.
Represented By: Steven J. Fineman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?