Ethypharm SA France v. Abbott Laboratories
Plaintiff: Ethypharm SA France
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories
Case Number: 1:2008cv00126
Filed: March 3, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: XX Outside US
Presiding Judge: Unassigned Judge
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 207 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 8/23/2011. (nmf)
November 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 146 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER it is ORDERED ADJUDGED and DECREED that Ethypharms motion (D.I. 118) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 11/15/2010. (cak)
November 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 142 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER Ethypharm's motion to issue letters of request for international judicial assistance (France and Switzerland) 114 is hereby GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 11/2/2010. (cak)
February 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 2/20/2009. (nmf)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ethypharm SA France v. Abbott Laboratories
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ethypharm SA France
Represented By: Gregory Brian Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?