Leader Technologies Inc. v. Facebook Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff: Leader Technologies Inc.
Defendant: Facebook Inc.
Case Number: 1:2008cv00862
Filed: November 19, 2008
Court: Delaware District Court
Office: Patent Office
County: New Castle
Presiding Judge: Unassigned Judge
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 35:271 Patent Infringement

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 20, 2011 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 699 Joint STIPULATION Regarding Amendment to Stipulated Protective Order re 138 Stipulation by Facebook Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 6/20/2011. (rpg)
June 17, 2011 699 Joint STIPULATION Regarding Amendment to Stipulated Protective Order re 138 Stipulation by Facebook Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Caponi, Steven)
May 9, 2011 698 NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA for the Federal Circuit re 696 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit) filed by Leader Technologies Inc. USCA Case Number 2011-1366 (ntl)
May 5, 2011 697 NOTICE of TRANSCRIPT PURCHASE ORDER (FORM 22) by Leader Technologies Inc. re 696 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit), Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit) (Attachments: # 1 Form 22 Transcript Purchase Order)(Rovner, Philip)
April 25, 2011 Notification regarding 696 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit), Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit) sent to Reporter Gaffigan (ksr)
April 25, 2011 Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit re 696 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit), Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit). (ksr)
April 21, 2011 APPEAL - Credit Card Payment of $ 455.00 received re 696 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit), Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit) filed by Leader Technologies Inc.. ( Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0311-879057.) (Rovner, Philip)
April 21, 2011 696 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Federal Circuit of 694 Judgment, 683 Order on Motion in Limine,,,, Order on Motion to Strike,,,,, 686 Memorandum Opinion, 687 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law,,,,,,,,,,. Appeal filed by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Rovner, Philip)
April 4, 2011 695 Official Transcript of Telephone Conference held on March 23, 2011 before Judge Stark. Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan, Telephone number (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/25/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/5/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/5/2011. (bpg)
March 28, 2011 694 Order for Entry of Final Judgment Under Fed.R.Civ.P. 54(b). Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/28/11. (ntl)
March 25, 2011 693 Letter to THE HONORABLE LEONARD P. STARK from PHILIP A. ROVNER, ESQ. regarding PROPOSED ORDER FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 54(b) - re 692 Proposed Order. (Rovner, Philip)
March 25, 2011 692 Joint PROPOSED ORDER Proposed Order for Entry of Final Judgment Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(b) re Telephone Conference by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Rovner, Philip)
March 23, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark - Telephone Conference held on 3/23/2011. (Court Reporter B. Gaffigan.) (ntl)
March 22, 2011 691 Joint Letter to THE HONORABLE LEONARD P. STARK from PHILIP A. ROVNER, ESQ. regarding JOINT LETTER PURSUANT TO THE COURT'S ORAL ORDER OF MARCH 18, 2011 RE FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - re 690 Order Setting Teleconference,,. (Rovner, Philip)
March 18, 2011 690 Featured Case ORAL ORDER: Having reviewed the parties' recent letters (D.I. 688 , D.I. 689 ), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the Court will hold a status teleconference on Wednesday, March 23, 2011 at 2:30 p.m. Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate the call to 302-573-4573. The parties shall submit a joint letter, not to exceed three (3) pages, outlining their specific proposals for further proceedings in this matter. The letter shall be filed no later than March 22, 2011. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/18/11. (ntl)
March 17, 2011 689 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Steven L. Caponi regarding status conference - re 688 Letter,. (Caponi, Steven)
March 17, 2011 688 Letter to THE HONORABLE LEONARD P. STARK from PHILIP A. ROVNER, ESQ. regarding REQUEST FOR A STATUS CONFERENCE - re 683 Order on Motion in Limine,,,, Order on Motion to Strike,,,,, 686 Memorandum Opinion, 687 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law,,,,,,,,,, 684 Memorandum Opinion, 685 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,. (Rovner, Philip)
March 14, 2011 687 Featured Case ORDER denying 382 Motion for Summary Judgment ; denying 626 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law ; denying 628 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law ; denying 629 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law ; granting 630 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law ; denying 631 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/14/11. (ntl)
March 14, 2011 686 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION re post-trial motions. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/14/11. (ntl)
March 14, 2011 685 Featured Case ORDER denying 389 Motion for Summary Judgment ; denying 403 Motion for Summary Judgment ; denying 408 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/14/11. (ntl)
March 14, 2011 684 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION re motions for summary judgment 389 , 403 , and 408 . Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/14/11. (ntl)
March 14, 2011 683 Featured Case ORDER denying 417 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 418 Motion in Limine; granting 420 Motion in Limine; denying 421 Motion in Limine; granting 422 Motion in Limine; denying as moot 548 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/14/11. (ntl)
February 25, 2011 682 Letter to THE HONORABLE LEONARD P. STARK from PHILIP A. ROVNER, ESQ. regarding RESPONSE TO FACEBOOK'S FEBRUARY 23, 2011 LETTER - re 681 Letter,. (Rovner, Philip)
February 23, 2011 681 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Steven L. Caponi regarding recent Federal Circuit opinion relevant to Facebook's pending Motion for Summary Judgment and Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law of Invalidity - re 382 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of Claims 1, 4, 7, 21, 23, 25 31 and 32 of U.S. Patent No. 7,139,761, 631 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law of Invalidity. (Attachments: # 1 Recent Federal Circuit Opinion)(Caponi, Steven)
January 31, 2011 680 Letter to THE HONORABLE LEONARD P. STARK from PHILIP A. ROVNER, ESQ. regarding RESPONSE TO FACEBOOK'S JANUARY 28, 2011 LETTER - re 679 Letter,. (Rovner, Philip)
January 28, 2011 679 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Steven L. Caponi regarding Notice of Supplemental Authority - re 628 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law of No Direct Infringement, 632 MEMORANDUM in Support,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Caponi, Steven)
January 10, 2011 678 Featured Case ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Facebook, Inc.'s Motion for Redaction of Electronic Transcript of the March 12, 2010 Hearing (D.I. 673 ) is DENIED. Plaintiff, Leader Technologies, Inc., asserts that Facebook "did not even attempt to make a reasonable effort to come to an agreement regarding this motion," in violation of Local Rule 7.1.1. (D.I. 675 at 2) There is no evidence of record nor argument from Facebook to the contrary. Moreover, the information Facebook seeks to redact consists of general discussion of some of the processes by which Facebook writes and revises its sourcecode; it does not disclose any of the content of Facebook's sourcecode. Accordingly, on balance, the Court does not believe it appropriate to redact the material proposed for redaction by Facebook. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/10/11. (ntl)
January 7, 2011 677 REPLY to Response to Motion re 673 MOTION to Redact 672 Transcript, (March 12, 2010 Hearing) filed by Facebook Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Caponi, Steven)
January 6, 2011 676 Featured Case ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Facebook's reply in support of its Motion for Redaction of Electronic Transcript of the March 12, 2010 Hearing (D.I. 673 ), if any, is due no later than January 7, 2011. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/6/11. (ntl)
January 5, 2011 675 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 673 MOTION to Redact 672 Transcript, (March 12, 2010 Hearing) LEADER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S OPPOSITION TO FACEBOOK INC.'S MOTION FOR REDACTION OF ELECTRONIC TRANSCRIPT OF THE MARCH 12, 2010 HEARING filed by Leader Technologies Inc.(a Delaware corporation).Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 1/18/2011. (Rovner, Philip)
January 5, 2011 674 Featured Case ORDER granting 641 Motion to Redact 620 Transcript, 621 Transcript. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/5/11. (ntl)
December 28, 2010 673 MOTION to Redact 672 Transcript, (March 12, 2010 Hearing) - filed by Facebook Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Caponi, Steven)
December 13, 2010 672 Official Transcript of Oral Argument held on 03-12-10 before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter/Transcriber Heather Triozzi. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/3/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/13/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/14/2011. (lad)
October 1, 2010 671 REDACTED VERSION of 634 MEMORANDUM in Support, of Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law of No Indirect Infringement by Facebook Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Caponi, Steven)
October 1, 2010 670 REDACTED VERSION of 633 MEMORANDUM in Support, of Facebook, Inc.'s Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law of No Literal Infringement and No Infringement Under the Doctrine of Equivalents by Facebook Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Caponi, Steven)
October 1, 2010 669 REDACTED VERSION of 632 MEMORANDUM in Support, Of Facebook, Inc.'s Renewed Mofion for Judgment as a Matter of Law of No Direct Infringement by Facebook Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Caponi, Steven)
September 30, 2010 668 RESPONSE to Motion re 641 MOTION to Redact 620 Transcript, 621 Transcript, PLAINTIFF LEADER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT FACEBOOK, INC.'S MOTION FOR REDACTION OF ELECTRONIC TRANSCRIPT OF TRIAL PROCEEDINGS filed by Leader Technologies Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Rovner, Philip)
September 30, 2010 667 DECLARATION re 666 Reply Brief of Mark R. Weinstein by Facebook Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit F - Part 1, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit F - Part 2)(Caponi, Steven)
September 30, 2010 666 REPLY BRIEF re 382 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of Claims 1, 4, 7, 21, 23, 25 31 and 32 of U.S. Patent No. 7,139,761 filed by Facebook Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Caponi, Steven)
September 27, 2010 665 REPLY BRIEF re 626 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law PLAINTIFF LEADER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S RENEWED MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW OR A NEW TRIAL PURSUANT TO RULES 50(b) AND 59 OF THE FED. R. CIV. P. MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law PLAINTIFF LEADER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S RENEWED MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW OR A NEW TRIAL PURSUANT TO RULES 50(b) AND 59 OF THE FED. R. CIV. P. filed by Leader Technologies Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Rovner, Philip)
September 27, 2010 664 REPLY BRIEF re 631 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law of Invalidity filed by Facebook Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Caponi, Steven)
September 27, 2010 663 REPLY BRIEF re 628 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law of No Direct Infringement filed by Facebook Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Caponi, Steven)
September 27, 2010 662 REPLY BRIEF re 629 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law of No Literal Infringement and No Infringement Under the Doctrine of Equivalents filed by Facebook Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Caponi, Steven)
September 27, 2010 661 Supplemental DECLARATION re 628 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law of No Direct Infringement, 660 Reply Brief Declaration of Elizabeth Stameshkin in Support by Facebook Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Caponi, Steven)
September 27, 2010 660 REPLY BRIEF re 628 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law of No Direct Infringement filed by Facebook Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Caponi, Steven)
September 22, 2010 659 REDACTED VERSION of 649 Declaration, PUBLIC VERSION OF DECLARATION OF RYAN HOPKINS, VOLUME 4, EXHIBITS 31-36 by Leader Technologies Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 31, # 2 Exhibit 32, # 3 Exhibit 33, # 4 Exhibit 34, # 5 Exhibit 35, # 6 Exhibit 36)(Rovner, Philip)
September 22, 2010 658 REDACTED VERSION of 648 Declaration, PUBLIC VERSION OF DECLARATION OF RYAN HOPKINS, VOLUME 3, EXHIBITS 29-30 by Leader Technologies Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 29, # 2 Exhibit 30)(Rovner, Philip)
September 22, 2010 657 REDACTED VERSION of 647 Declaration, PUBLIC VERSION OF DECLARATION OF RYAN HOPKINS, VOLUME 2, EXHIBITS 26-28 by Leader Technologies Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 26, # 2 Exhibit 27 PART 1, # 3 Exhibit 27 PART 2, # 4 Exhibit 27 PART 3, # 5 Exhibit 27 PART 4, # 6 Exhibit 28 PART 1, # 7 Exhibit 28 PART 2, # 8 Exhibit 28 PART 3, # 9 Exhibit 28 PART 4, # 10 Exhibit 28 PART 5, # 11 Exhibit 28 PART 6, # 12 Exhibit 28 PART 7, # 13 Exhibit 28 PART 8)(Rovner, Philip)
September 22, 2010 656 REDACTED VERSION of 646 Declaration, PUBLIC VERSION OF DECLARATION OF RYAN HOPKINS, VOLUME 1, EXHIBITS 1-25 by Leader Technologies Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22 PART 1, # 23 Exhibit 22 PART 2, # 24 Exhibit 23, # 25 Exhibit 24, # 26 Exhibit 25)(Rovner, Philip)
September 22, 2010 655 REDACTED VERSION of 643 Answering Brief in Opposition,, PUBLIC VERSION OF PLAINTIFF LEADER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S OPPOSITION TO FACEBOOK, INC.'S RENEWED MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW (JMOL) OF NO LITERAL INFRINGEMENT AND NO INFRINGEMENT UNDER THE DOCTRINE OF EQUIVALENTS [MOTION NO. 2] by Leader Technologies Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Rovner, Philip)
September 20, 2010 654 DECLARATION re 652 Answering Brief in Opposition, DECLARATION OF YURIDIA CAIRE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF LEADER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT FACEBOOK, INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INVALIDITY OF CLAIMS 1, 4, 7, 21, 23, 25, 31 AND 32 OF U.S. PATENT NO. 7,139,761 by Leader Technologies Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Rovner, Philip)
September 20, 2010 653 DECLARATION re 652 Answering Brief in Opposition, DECLARATION OF JAMES HERBSLEB IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF LEADER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT FACEBOOK, INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INVALIDITY OF CLAIMS 1, 4, 7, 21, 23, 25, 31 AND 32 OF U.S. PATENT NO. 7,139,761 by Leader Technologies Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Rovner, Philip)
September 20, 2010 652 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 382 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of Claims 1, 4, 7, 21, 23, 25 31 and 32 of U.S. Patent No. 7,139,761 PLAINTIFF LEADER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT FACEBOOK, INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INVALIDITY OF CLAIMS 1, 4, 7, 21, 23, 25, 31 AND 32 OF U.S. PATENT NO. 7,139,761 filed by Leader Technologies Inc.(a Delaware corporation).Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 9/30/2010. (Rovner, Philip)
September 15, 2010 651 DECLARATION re 650 Answering Brief in Opposition,, -- Declaration of Jeffrey T. Norberg in Support of Defendant Facebook, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law and for a New Trial by Facebook Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O)(Caponi, Steven)
September 15, 2010 650 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 626 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law PLAINTIFF LEADER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S RENEWED MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW OR A NEW TRIAL PURSUANT TO RULES 50(b) AND 59 OF THE FED. R. CIV. P. MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law PLAINTIFF LEADER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S RENEWED MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW OR A NEW TRIAL PURSUANT TO RULES 50(b) AND 59 OF THE FED. R. CIV. P. filed by Facebook Inc.(a Delaware corporation).Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 9/27/2010. (Caponi, Steven)
September 15, 2010 649 SEALED DECLARATION re 645 Answering Brief in Opposition, 644 Answering Brief in Opposition, 642 Answering Brief in Opposition, 643 Answering Brief in Opposition,, DECLARATION OF RYAN HOPKINS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF LEADER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S OPPOSITIONS TO DEFENDANT FACEBOOK, INC.'S RENEWED MOTIONS FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW, VOLUME 4- EXHIBITS 31-36 by Leader Technologies Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Rovner, Philip)
September 15, 2010 648 SEALED DECLARATION re 645 Answering Brief in Opposition, 644 Answering Brief in Opposition, 642 Answering Brief in Opposition, 643 Answering Brief in Opposition,, DECLARATION OF RYAN HOPKINS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF LEADER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S OPPOSITIONS TO DEFENDANT FACEBOOK, INC.'S RENEWED MOTIONS FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW, VOLUME 3- EXHIBITS 29-30 by Leader Technologies Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Rovner, Philip)
September 15, 2010 647 SEALED DECLARATION re 645 Answering Brief in Opposition, 644 Answering Brief in Opposition, 642 Answering Brief in Opposition, 643 Answering Brief in Opposition,, DECLARATION OF RYAN HOPKINS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF LEADER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S OPPOSITIONS TO DEFENDANT FACEBOOK, INC.'S RENEWED MOTIONS FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW, VOLUME 2- EXHIBITS 26-28 by Leader Technologies Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Rovner, Philip)
September 15, 2010 646 SEALED DECLARATION re 645 Answering Brief in Opposition, 644 Answering Brief in Opposition, 642 Answering Brief in Opposition, 643 Answering Brief in Opposition,, DECLARATION OF RYAN HOPKINS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF LEADER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S OPPOSITIONS TO DEFENDANT FACEBOOK, INC.'S RENEWED MOTIONS FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW, VOLUME 1- EXHIBITS 1-25 by Leader Technologies Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Rovner, Philip)
September 15, 2010 645 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 631 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law of Invalidity PLAINTIFF LEADER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT FACEBOOK, INC.'S RENEWED MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW (JMOL) OF INVALIDITY [MOTION NO. 4] filed by Leader Technologies Inc.(a Delaware corporation).Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 9/27/2010. (Rovner, Philip)
September 15, 2010 644 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 630 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law of No Indirect Infringement PLAINTIFF LEADER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT FACEBOOK, INC.'S RENEWED MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW (JMOL) OF NO INDIRECT INFRINGEMENT [MOTION NO. 3] filed by Leader Technologies Inc.(a Delaware corporation).Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 9/27/2010. (Rovner, Philip)
September 15, 2010 643 SEALED ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 629 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law of No Literal Infringement and No Infringement Under the Doctrine of Equivalents PLAINTIFF LEADER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S OPPOSITION TO FACEBOOK, INC.'S RENEWED MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW (JMOL) OF NO LITERAL INFRINGEMENT AND NO INFRINGEMENT UNDER THE DOCTRINE OF EQUIVALENTS [MOTION NO. 2] filed by Leader Technologies Inc.(a Delaware corporation).Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 9/27/2010. (Rovner, Philip)
September 15, 2010 642 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 628 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law of No Direct Infringement PLAINTIFF LEADER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT FACEBOOK, INC.'S RENEWED MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW (JMOL) OF NO DIRECT INFRINGEMENT [MOTION NO. 1] filed by Leader Technologies Inc.(a Delaware corporation).Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 9/27/2010. (Rovner, Philip)
September 14, 2010 641 MOTION to Redact 620 Transcript, 621 Transcript, - filed by Facebook Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Proposed Redactions, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Caponi, Steven)
August 31, 2010 640 Featured Case ORDER denying Leader's 638 Letter motion to strike. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/31/10. (ntl)
August 30, 2010 639 Letter to the Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Steven L. Caponi, counsel for Defendant Facebook Inc. regarding Plaintiff Leader Technologies, Inc.'s letter to the Court (D.I. 638) - re 638 Letter,,. (Caponi, Steven)
August 30, 2010 638 Letter to THE HONORABLE LEONARD P. STARK from PHILIP A. ROVNER, ESQ. regarding FACEBOOK'S IMPROPER RULE 50(b) MOTIONS - re 628 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law of No Direct Infringement, 630 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law of No Indirect Infringement, 629 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law of No Literal Infringement and No Infringement Under the Doctrine of Equivalents, 631 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law of Invalidity. (Rovner, Philip)
August 25, 2010 637 SEALED EXHIBIT re 630 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law of No Indirect Infringement, 629 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law of No Literal Infringement and No Infringement Under the Doctrine of Equivalents, 1 Complaint, 628 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law of No Direct Infringement, 636 Declaration,,, 631 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law of Invalidity Confidential - Under Seal Exhibits 1, 3, 6, 7, 13-21 to Declaration of Elizabeth Stameshkin in Support of Defendant Facebook, Inc.'s Renewed Motions for Judgment as a Matter of Law by Facebook Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 3, # 3 Exhibit 6, # 4 Exhibit 7, # 5 Exhibit 13, # 6 Exhibit 14, # 7 Exhibit 15, # 8 Exhibit 16, # 9 Exhibit 17, # 10 Exhibit 18, # 11 Exhibit 19, # 12 Exhibit 20, # 13 Exhibit 21)(Caponi, Steven)
August 25, 2010 636 DECLARATION re 630 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law of No Indirect Infringement, 629 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law of No Literal Infringement and No Infringement Under the Doctrine of Equivalents, 1 Complaint, 628 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law of No Direct Infringement, 631 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law of Invalidity -- Declaration of Elizabeth Stameshkin in Support of Defendant Facebook, Inc.'s Renewed Motions for Judgment as a Matter of Law by Facebook Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2, # 2 Exhibit 4, # 3 Exhibit 5, # 4 Exhibit 8, # 5 Exhibit 9, # 6 Exhibit 10, # 7 Exhibit 11, # 8 Exhibit 12, # 9 Exhibit 22, # 10 Exhibit 23, # 11 Exhibit 24, # 12 Exhibit 25, # 13 Exhibit 26)(Caponi, Steven)
August 25, 2010 635 MEMORANDUM in Support re 631 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law of Invalidity filed by Facebook Inc.(a Delaware corporation).Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 9/13/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Memorandum in Support of Defendant Facebook's Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law of Invalidity)(Caponi, Steven)
August 25, 2010 634 SEALED MEMORANDUM in Support re 630 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law of No Indirect Infringement filed by Facebook Inc.(a Delaware corporation).Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 9/13/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Filed Under Seal)(Caponi, Steven)
August 25, 2010 633 SEALED MEMORANDUM in Support re 629 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law of No Literal Infringement and No Infringement Under the Doctrine of Equivalents filed by Facebook Inc.(a Delaware corporation).Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 9/13/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Filed Under Seal)(Caponi, Steven)
August 25, 2010 632 SEALED MEMORANDUM in Support re 628 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law of No Direct Infringement filed by Facebook Inc.(a Delaware corporation).Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 9/13/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Filed Under Seal)(Caponi, Steven)
August 25, 2010 631 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law of Invalidity - filed by Facebook Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order for Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law of Invalidity)(Caponi, Steven)
August 25, 2010 630 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law of No Indirect Infringement - filed by Facebook Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order for Renewed Motion for Judgement as a Matter of Law of No Indirect Infringement)(Caponi, Steven)
August 25, 2010 629 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law of No Literal Infringement and No Infringement Under the Doctrine of Equivalents - filed by Facebook Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order for Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law of No Literal Infringement and No Infringement Under the Doctrine of Equivalents)(Caponi, Steven)
August 25, 2010 628 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law of No Direct Infringement - filed by Facebook Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order for Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law of No Direct Infringement)(Caponi, Steven)
August 25, 2010 627 DECLARATION re 626 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law PLAINTIFF LEADER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S RENEWED MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW OR A NEW TRIAL PURSUANT TO RULES 50(b) AND 59 OF THE FED. R. CIV. P. MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law PLAINTIFF LEADER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S RENEWED MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW OR A NEW TRIAL PURSUANT TO RULES 50(b) AND 59 OF THE FED. R. CIV. P. DECLARATION OF PAUL ANDRE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF LEADER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S RENEWED MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW OR A NEW TRIAL PURSUANT TO RULES 50(b) AND 59 OF THE FED. R. CIV. P. by Leader Technologies Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26 PART 1, # 27 Exhibit 26 PART 2, # 28 Exhibit 26 PART 3, # 29 Exhibit 26 PART 4)(Rovner, Philip)
August 25, 2010 626 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law PLAINTIFF LEADER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S RENEWED MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW OR A NEW TRIAL PURSUANT TO RULES 50(b) AND 59 OF THE FED. R. CIV. P. - filed by Leader Technologies Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Rovner, Philip)
August 24, 2010 625 Official Transcript of Jury Trial (Day 7) held on 07-27-10 before Judge Leoanrd P. Stark. Court Reporter/Transcriber Heather Triozzi. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/14/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/24/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/22/2010. (lad)
August 24, 2010 624 Official Transcript of Jury Trial (Day 6) held on 07-26-10 before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter/Transcriber Heather Triozzi. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/14/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/24/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/22/2010. (lad)
August 24, 2010 623 Official Transcript of Jury Trial (Day 5) held on 07-23-10 before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter/Transcriber Heather Triozzi. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/14/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/24/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/22/2010. (lad)
August 24, 2010 622 Official Transcript of Jury Trial (Day 4) held on 07-22-10 before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leonard A. Dibbs. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/14/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/24/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/22/2010. (lad)
August 24, 2010 621 SEALED Official Transcript of Jury Trial (Day 3) held on 07-21-10 before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leonard A. Dibbs. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/14/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/24/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/22/2010. (lad) (Main Document 621 replaced on 1/5/2011) (dzs, ). Document placed under seal on 1/5/2011 per Order D.I. 674 (dzs, ).
August 24, 2010 620 SEALED Official Transcript of Jury Trial (Day 2) held on 07-20-10 before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leonard A. DIbbs. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/14/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/24/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/22/2010. (lad) (Main Document 620 replaced on 1/5/2011) (dzs, ). Document placed under seal on 1/5/2011 per Order D.I. 674 (dzs, ).
August 24, 2010 619 Official Transcript of Jury Trial (Day 1) held on 07-19-10 before Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leonard A. Dibbs. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/14/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/24/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/22/2010. (lad)
August 12, 2010 617 REDACTED VERSION of 506 Exhibit to a Document Declaration of Melissa H. Keyes in Support of Defendant Facebook, Inc.'s Memorandum in Support of Motoin In Limine No. 12 by Facebook Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-6 redacted in their entirety)(Caponi, Steven)
August 12, 2010 616 REDACTED VERSION of 502 Exhibit to a Document to Declaration of Melissa H. Keyes in Support of Counter-Statement of Disputed Material Facts Related to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment by Facebook Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-6 redacted in their entirety)(Caponi, Steven)
August 12, 2010 615 REDACTED VERSION of 504 MEMORANDUM in Support of Facebook, Inc.'s Motion in Limine No. 12 by Facebook Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Caponi, Steven)
August 12, 2010 614 REDACTED VERSION of 500 Response to Motion Counter-Statement of Disputed Material Facts Related to Plaintiff's Motion For Summary Judgment by Facebook Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Caponi, Steven)
August 5, 2010 613 Featured Case ORDER setting post-trial briefing schedule: Motions and Opening Briefs due 8/25/2010. Answering Briefs due 9/15/2010. Reply Briefs due 9/27/2010. Leader's Answering Brief to 382 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of Claims 1, 4, 7, 21, 23, 25 31 and 32 of U.S. Patent No. 7,139,761 due by 9/20/2010. Facebook's Reply due 9/30/2010. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/5/2010. (rpg)
August 2, 2010 612 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law PLAINTIFF LEADER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 50(a) - filed by Leader Technologies Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Rovner, Philip)
August 2, 2010 611 Joint Letter to THE HONORABLE LEONARD P. STARK from PHILIP A. ROVNER, ESQ. regarding POST-TRIAL BRIEFING - re 609 Transcript, Jury Trial - Completed. (Rovner, Philip)
July 28, 2010 618 Featured Case ORDER furnishing lunch for jury. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/28/2010. (rpg)
July 28, 2010 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark - Jury Trial completed on 7/28/2010. (Court Reporter Leonard Dibbs.) (rpg)
July 28, 2010 610 JURY VERDICT dated 7/28/2010. (rpg)
July 28, 2010 609 Official Transcript of In Courtroom Conference held on 07-28-10 before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leoanrd A. Dibbs. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/18/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/30/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/26/2010. (lad)
July 28, 2010 608 Official Transcript of Verdict held on 07-28-10 before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leonard A. Dibbs. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/18/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/30/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/26/2010. (lad)
July 28, 2010 607 Official Transcript of Final Pretrial Conference held on 07-16-10 before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter/Transcriber Deanna Warner. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/18/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/30/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/26/2010. (lad)
July 27, 2010 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark - Jury Trial held on 7/27/2010. (Court Reporter Hawkins Reporting Service.) (rpg)
July 27, 2010 606 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law - filed by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven)
July 27, 2010 605 OBJECTIONS by Facebook Inc. to 601 Jury Instructions Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 51(b) and 51(c)(2). (Caponi, Steven)
July 26, 2010 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark - Jury Trial (Day 6) held on 7/26/2010. (Court Reporter: Hawkins Reporting) (ntl)
July 26, 2010 604 Letter to THE HONORABLE LEONARD P. STARK from PHILIP A. ROVNER, ESQ. regarding ERRATA TO LEADER'S PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTION 4.2 (SERVED 7/24/10) - re 603 Letter, Jury Trial - Held. (Attachments: # 1 eRRATA TO PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTION 4.2)(Rovner, Philip)
July 26, 2010 603 Letter to THE HONORABLE LEONARD P. STARK from PHILIP A. ROVNER, ESQ. regarding LIMITING JURY INSTRUCTIONS (SERVED 7/24/10) - re Jury Trial - Held. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Jury Instruction 4.2, # 2 Limiting instructions, # 3 Proposed Stipulation re commercial success)(Rovner, Philip)
July 26, 2010 602 Proposed VERDICT SHEET. (ntl)
July 26, 2010 601 Final Jury Instructions. (ntl)
July 26, 2010 600 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Steven L. Caponi regarding objections and responses to Leader's proposed instructions - re 598 Letter. (Attachments: # 1 Objections and Responses)(Caponi, Steven)
July 26, 2010 599 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Steven L. Caponi regarding Your Honor's request for limiting instructions and to address a prejudicial matter that arose at the proceedings held on 7-23-10. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Caponi, Steven)
July 25, 2010 598 SEALED Letter to THE HONORABLE LEONARD P. STARK from PHILIP A. ROVNER, ESQ. regarding RESPONSE TO FACEBOOK'S LETTER MOTION FOR MISTRIAL. (Rovner, Philip)
July 23, 2010 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark - Jury Trial held on 7/23/2010. (Court Reporter Hawkins Court Reporting Service.) (rpg)
July 23, 2010 597 VERDICT SHEET by Facebook Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Caponi, Steven)
July 23, 2010 596 Proposed Jury Instructions by Facebook Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Caponi, Steven)
July 23, 2010 595 VERDICT SHEET by Leader Technologies Inc. LEADER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S PROPOSED SPECIAL VERDICT FORM. (Rovner, Philip)
July 22, 2010 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark - Jury Trial (Day 4) held on 7/22/2010. (Court Reporter: Hawkins Rptg.) (ntl)
July 21, 2010 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark - Jury Trial (Day 3) held on 7/21/2010. (Court Reporter: Hawkins Rptg.) (ntl)
July 20, 2010 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark - Jury Trial (Day 2) held on 7/20/2010. (Court Reporter: Hawkins Rptg.) (ntl)
July 19, 2010 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark - Jury Trial (Day 1) held on 7/19/2010. (Court Reporter: Hawkins Rptg.) (ntl)
July 19, 2010 594 Letter to Hon. Leonard P. Stark from Steven L. Caponi regarding Depo Designations, Counter Designations and Page Nos. of Associated Objections. (Caponi, Steven)
July 18, 2010 Featured Case ORAL ORDER by Judge Leonard P. Stark: Having reviewed Facebooks July 17, 2010 motion to admit evidence of four offers for sale and two public demonstrations of Leader2Leader in addition to those disclosed by Facebook in its supplemental interrogatory responses of April 19, 2010, and Leaders July 18, 2010 opposition to Facebooks motion, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Facebooks motion is DENIED. Facebooks motion does not provide a basis either for reconsideration of the Courts decision during the final pretrial conference (July 16, 2010) to limit Facebook to the evidence disclosed in its April 19, 2010 interrogatory responses or for the admissibility of the additional offers for sale and public demonstrations. Moreover, the exhibits Facebooks motion seeks to admit appeared on Facebooks Amended Exhibit List, dated June 30, 2010, and Facebook provides no satisfactory explanation for why it waited more than two additional weeks until serving its Fifth Supplemental responses to interrogatories on July 16, 2010 to notify Leader it intended to use these exhibits as a basis for seeking to invalidate the patent-in-suit. Nor can the Court conclude that Facebook was unable to provide such notice to Leader on or around June 11 (after the first deposition of Zacks), or June 16 (after Facebook received copies of the entire Zacks document production), or July 6 (after the second deposition of Zacks). Additionally, Facebook does not explain why, with trial set to begin in 13 days, it took nine days after Zacks second deposition (July 6) for Facebook to obtain Zacks authentication declaration. Given the attention devoted by the parties and the Court to Facebooks affirmative defenses based on offers for sale and public demonstrations even after the passage of the discovery deadline, the notice requirement of 35 U.S.C. § 282, and the imminency of trial, waiting until the last business day before trial to advise Leader of these additional bases for its invalidity contentions, under all the circumstances, rendered Facebooks notice untimely. (rpg)
July 18, 2010 593 SEALED Letter to THE HONORABLE LEONARD P. STARK from PHILIP A. ROVNER, ESQ. regarding OFFERS FOR SALE AND PUBLIC DEMONSTRATIONS - re Pretrial Conference - Final. (Rovner, Philip)
July 17, 2010 Featured Case ORAL ORDER by Judge Leonard P. Stark: Having reviewed the parties' joint letter of July 17, 2010, and Facebook's proposed demonstrative exhibits to be used in connection with its opening statement, Leader's objections to Facebook's proposed demonstrative exhibits are hereby OVERRULED. (rpg)
July 17, 2010 592 Joint Letter to THE HONORABLE LEONARD P. STARK from PHILIP A. ROVNER, ESQ. regarding AMENDED DEMONSTRATIVES. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Rovner, Philip)
July 17, 2010 591 SEALED EXHIBIT re 590 Letter to Hon. Judge Leonard P. Stark by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven)
July 17, 2010 590 SEALED Letter to Hon. Judge Leonard P. Stark from Steven Caponi regarding In Response to July 16, 2010 Oral Order. (Caponi, Steven)
July 16, 2010 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 588 and 598 Proposed Orders regarding technology request filed by Leader Technologies Inc. and Facebook, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/16/2010. (rpg)
July 16, 2010 589 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Steven L. Caponi regarding revised order granting use of equipment - re 584 Letter. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caponi, Steven)
July 16, 2010 588 Letter to THE HONORABLE LEONARD P. STARK from PHILIP A. ROVNER, ESQ. regarding EQUIPMENT FOR TRIAL. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rovner, Philip)
July 16, 2010 Featured Case ORAL ORDER by Judge Leonard P. Stark: Having received Facebook's letter dated today, July 16, 2010 (D.I. 585 ), Facebook is directed to provide a copy of its revised demonstrative exhibits to be used during its opening statement in electronic form (i.e.,.pptx or.ppt) by 4:30 p.m. today, July 16, 2010, to both the Court and Leader. The submission to the Court must include a courtesy copy sent by email to Courtroom Deputy Ronald Golden. Should Leader continue to object to Facebook's proposed demonstratives to be used during its opening statement, the parties shall advise the Court by joint letter, not to exceed three pages, detailing their positions with respect to any remaining objections. Such letter shall be filed no later than 10:00 a.m. on July 17, 2010. The parties shall send a courtesy copy of their letter by email to Courtroom Deputy Ronald Golden. (rpg)
July 16, 2010 587 Letter to THE HONORABLE LEONARD P. STARK from PHILIP A. ROVNER, ESQ. regarding DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS - re 574 Letter. (Rovner, Philip)
July 16, 2010 586 Letter to THE HONORABLE LEONARD P. STARK from PHILIP A. ROVNER, ESQ. regarding DEMONSTRATIVE EXHIBITS - re 585 Letter. (Rovner, Philip)
July 16, 2010 585 Letter to the Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Steven L. Caponi regarding Opening Statement demonstratives. (Caponi, Steven)
July 16, 2010 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark - Final Pretrial Conference held on 7/16/2010. (Court Reporter Deanna Warner Hawkins Reporting Service.) (rpg)
July 16, 2010 584 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Steven L. Caponi regarding request for equipment and internet access. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caponi, Steven)
July 16, 2010 583 SEALED EXHIBIT re 582 Letter (Exhibits A - H) by Facebook Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Caponi, Steven)
July 16, 2010 582 SEALED Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Steven L. Caponi regarding Response to Order Dated July 14, 2010 - re 576 Order. (Caponi, Steven)
July 15, 2010 581 SEALED Letter to THE HONOORABLE LEONARD P. STARK from PHILIP A. ROVNER regarding ADMISSIBILITY OF EXHIBITS PURSUANT TO COURT'S ORDER OF JULY 14, 2010 D.I. 576 - re 576 Order. (Rovner, Philip)
July 15, 2010 580 Preliminary Jury Instructions for Jury Trial to begin on 7/19/2010 before Judge Leonard P. Stark. (rpg)
July 15, 2010 579 Voir Dire for Jury Trial to begin on 7/19/2010 before Judge Leonard P. Stark. (rpg)
July 14, 2010 578 Proposed Pretrial Order AMENDED JOINT PRETRIAL ORDER by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A1, # 2 Exhibit A2, # 3 Exhibit B1, # 4 Exhibit B2, # 5 Exhibit B3 PART 1, # 6 Exhibit B3 PART 2, # 7 Exhibit C1, # 8 Exhibit C2, # 9 Exhibit D1, # 10 Exhibit D2)(Rovner, Philip)
July 14, 2010 577 Proposed Jury Instructions by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 JOINT PROPOSED FINAL JURY INSTRUCTIONS PART 2)(Rovner, Philip)
July 14, 2010 576 Featured Case ORDER Regarding Objections and Directing Parties to submit items mentioned in Paragraphs 3.a and 3.b to the Court by no later than 7/16/2010 at 8:30 AM. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/14/2010. (rpg)
July 13, 2010 575 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Steven L. Caponi regarding Deposition Designations Pursuant to July 1 Directive - re 567 Transcript,. (Caponi, Steven)
July 13, 2010 574 Letter to THE HONORABLE LEONARD P. STARK from PHILIP A. ROVNER, ESQ. regarding DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS PURSUANT TO JULY 1 DIRECTIVE - re 567 Transcript,. (Rovner, Philip)
July 12, 2010 573 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Steven L. Caponi regarding potential list of witnesses and amended exhibit list Facebook intends to submit with the July 14, 2010 Joint Pretrail Order - re 567 Transcript,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Caponi, Steven)
July 12, 2010 572 Letter to THE HONORABLE LEONARD P. STARK from PHILIP A. ROVNER, ESQ. regarding ENCLOSING LEADER'S LIST OF POTENTIAL WITNESSES AND AMENDED TRIAL EXHIBIT LIST - re 567 Transcript, Pretrial Conference - Interim. (Attachments: # 1 Leader's List of Potential Witnesses, # 2 Plaintiff's Amended Trial Exhibit List)(Rovner, Philip)
July 12, 2010 571 Proposed Jury Instructions by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Rovner, Philip)
July 12, 2010 570 DECLARATION re 569 Letter DECLARATION OF RYAN HOPKINS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF LEADER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S LETTER BRIEF TO JUDGE STARK REGARDING THE JULY 1ST PRETRIAL CONFERENCE RULINGS by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-C)(Rovner, Philip)
July 12, 2010 569 Letter to THE HONORABLE LEONARD P. STARK from PHILIP A. ROVNER, ESQ. regarding LETTER BRIEF REGARDING THE JULY 1, 2010 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE RULINGS - re 567 Transcript, Pretrial Conference - Interim. (Rovner, Philip)
July 8, 2010 568 ANSWER to Complaint LEADER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S REPLY TO THIRD AMENDED COUNTERCLAIMS OF DEFENDANT FACEBOOK, INC. (SEE D.I. 304, 305) by Leader Technologies Inc..(Rovner, Philip)
July 3, 2010 567 Official Transcript of Pretrial Conference held on 07-01-10 before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leonard A. Dibbs. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/26/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/3/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/1/2010. (lad)
July 1, 2010 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark - Interim Pretrial Conference held on 7/1/2010. (Court Reporter Leonard Dibbs.) (rpg)
June 28, 2010 566 REDACTED VERSION of 547 Letter, PUBLIC VERSION OF LETTER TO THE HONORABLE LEONARD P. STARK FROM PHILIP A. ROVNER, ESQ. REGARDING OUTLINING THE DISCOVERY ISSUES IN DISPUTE PURSUANT TO COURT'S ORAL ORDER OF JUNE 17, 2010 WITH EXHIBITS A-K by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Rovner, Philip)
June 28, 2010 565 REDACTED VERSION of 549 Declaration, PUBLIC VERSION OF DECLARATION OF SHANE GLYNN IN SUPPORT OF LEADER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S MOTION TO STRIKE AND OPPOSITION TO FACEBOOK, INC.'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 12 WITH EXHIBITS A-H by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Rovner, Philip)
June 28, 2010 564 REDACTED VERSION of 548 SEALED MOTION to Strike 503 MOTION in Limine No. 12 LEADER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S MOTION TO STRIKE AND OPPOSITION TO FACEBOOK, INC.'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 12 by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Rovner, Philip)
June 28, 2010 563 Official Transcript of Telephone conference held on Friday, June 25, 2010 before Judge Stark. Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/19/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/29/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/27/2010. (bpg)
June 28, 2010 562 Featured Case ORDER DENYING re 544 SEALED Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Thomas P. Preston regarding Outlining the Discovery Issues in Dispute and 377 MOTION to Redact 344 Transcript, of Hearing of April 9, 2010 filed by Facebook Inc., AND DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE THE FOLLOWING MOTIONS: 426 MOTION in Limine PLAINTIFF LEADER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S DAUBERT MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY IN ITS ENTIRETY OF FACEBOOK'S EXPERTS JAMES HUGHES AND KIMBERLY FELIX filed by Leader Technologies Inc., 385 MOTION for Summary Judgment Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement and No Damages filed by Facebook Inc., 394 MOTION for Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 7,139,761 filed by Facebook Inc., 412 MOTION in Limine and Daubert Motion filed by Facebook Inc., 419 SEALED MOTION in Limine LEADER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF FACEBOOK'S SETTLEMENT AGREEMENTS AND EXPERT TESTIMONY REGARDING POTENTIAL DESIGN AROUNDS OR NON-INFRINGING ALTERNATIVES, WITH EXHIBIT A filed by Leader Technologies Inc., 503 MOTION in Limine No. 12 filed by Facebook Inc., 423 MOTION in Limine LEADER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 7 TO EXCLUDE REFERENCES TO A POTENTIAL INJUNCTION filed by Leader Technologies Inc., AND Setting Hearings. ( Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/16/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2A before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Pretrial Conference set for 7/1/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2A before Judge Leonard P. Stark ). Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 6/25/2010. (rpg)
June 25, 2010 561 REDACTED VERSION of 545 Exhibit to a Document Exhibits A-M to Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Thomas P. Preston regarding Outlining the Discovery Issues in Dispute and Facebook Inc.'s Position on Those Issues Pursuant to the Court's Oral Order of June 17, 2010 by Facebook Inc.. (Preston, Thomas)
June 25, 2010 560 REDACTED VERSION of 544 Letter, to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Thomas P. Preston regarding Outlining the Discovery Issues in Dispute and Facebook Inc.'s Position on Those Issues Pursuant to the Court's Oral Order of June 17, 2010 by Facebook Inc.. (Preston, Thomas)
June 25, 2010 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark - Telephone Conference held on 6/25/2010. (Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan.) (rpg)
June 24, 2010 559 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART re 304 MOTION for Leave to Amend Its Responsive Pleading to Add a Defense and Counterclaim of Inequitable Conduct and to Amend Its False Marking Counterclaim. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 6/24/2010. (rpg)
June 24, 2010 558 Featured Case ORDER Overruling the Objections filed at 309 Objections filed by Leader Technologies Inc., and 378 Motion for Objection to Magistrate Judge Stark's April 27 Order re Telephone Conference, filed by Facebook Inc.. Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 6/24/2010. (nms)
June 24, 2010 CORRECTING ENTRY: The docket text for D.I. 557 has been amended to reflect that the Memorandum Opinion was signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr.. (nms)
June 24, 2010 557 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION re 309 SEALED OBJECTIONS, and 378 MOTION for Objection to Magistrate Judge Stark's April 27 Order. Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 6/24/2010. (nms) Modified on 6/24/2010 (nms).
June 24, 2010 556 REDACTED VERSION of 538 Exhibit to a Document, re Declaration of Kathryn Robinson in Support of Defendant Facebook's Response to Leader Technologies, Inc.'s Counterstatements to Facebook's Motions for Summary Judgment (Exhibits 2-7) by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven)
June 24, 2010 555 REDACTED VERSION of 536 Reply Brief, re MOTION for Summary Judgment Based On Anticipation Under 35 U.S.C. Section 102(b) (Motion No. 6 of 6) by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven)
June 24, 2010 554 REDACTED VERSION of 534 Reply Brief re MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of U.S. Patent No. 7,139,761 Based on the On-Sale Bar (Motion No. 5 of 6) by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven)
June 24, 2010 553 REDACTED VERSION of 533 Reply Brief re MOTION for Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 7,139,761 (Motion No. 4 of 6) by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven)
June 24, 2010 552 REDACTED VERSION of 531 Reply Brief re Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement (Motion No. 3 of 6) by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven)
June 24, 2010 551 REDACTED VERSION of 529 Reply Brief re Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement and No Damages (Motion No. 2 of 6) by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven)
June 24, 2010 550 REDACTED VERSION of 517 Reply Brief in Support of Objections to Magistrate Judge Stark's April 27 Order by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven)
June 23, 2010 Featured Case ORAL ORDER by Judge Leonard P. Stark: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT a discovery telephone conference is scheduled for Friday, 6/25/2010 at 9:30 A.M. to discuss the pending discovery dispute re 544 SEALED Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Thomas P. Preston Outlining the Discovery Issues in Dispute and re 547 SEALED Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Philip A. Rovner, Esquire regarding Outlining the Discovery Issues in Dispute. Counsel for Defendant shall initiate the telephone conference to (302) 573-4573. (rpg)
June 22, 2010 CORRECTING ENTRY: language referencing a telephone conference in Oral Order dated 6/18/2010 deleted. Notice of electronic filing regenerated to all counsel of record. (rpg)
June 21, 2010 549 SEALED DECLARATION re 548 SEALED MOTION to Strike 503 MOTION in Limine No. 12 LEADER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S MOTION TO STRIKE AND OPPOSITION TO FACEBOOK, INC.'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 12, 503 MOTION in Limine No. 12 DECLARATION OF SHANE GLYNN IN SUPPORT OF LEADER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S MOTION TO STRIKE AND OPPOSITION TO FACEBOOK, INC.'S MOTION IN LMINE NO. 12 by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Rovner, Philip)
June 21, 2010 548 SEALED MOTION to Strike 503 MOTION in Limine No. 12 LEADER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S MOTION TO STRIKE AND OPPOSITION TO FACEBOOK, INC.'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 12 - filed by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Rovner, Philip)
June 21, 2010 547 SEALED Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Philip A. Rovner, Esquire regarding Outlining the Discovery Issues in Dispute and Leader Technologies Inc.'s Position on Those Issues Pursuant to the Court's Oral Order of June 17, 2010 - re 544 Letter,. (Rovner, Philip)
June 18, 2010 546 Proposed Jury Instructions by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Part 2 of proposed final jury instructions, # 2 Part 3 of proposed final jury instructions)(Rovner, Philip)
June 18, 2010 545 SEALED EXHIBIT re 544 Letter, (Exhibits A-M Under Seal) by Facebook Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Preston, Thomas)
June 18, 2010 544 SEALED Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Thomas P. Preston regarding Outlining the Discovery Issues in Dispute and Facebook Inc.'s Position on Those Issues Pursuant to the Court's Oral Order of June 17, 2010 - re Oral Order,,. (Preston, Thomas)
June 18, 2010 543 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 6/18/2010. (nms)
June 18, 2010 542 Letter to THE HONORABLE LEONARD P. STARK from PHILIP A. ROVNER, EQ. regarding COURTESY COPIES OF BRIEFING RELATED TO LEADER'S PENDING MOTIONS - re 522 Order Cancelling Deadline, Set Deadlines/Hearings, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines,,,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Chart of filings)(Rovner, Philip)
June 18, 2010 541 REDACTED VERSION of 524 Statement, PUBLIC VERSION OF PLAINTIFF LEADER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT FACEBOOK, INC.'S COUNTERSTATEMENT OF DISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS RELATED TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, WITH EXHIBIT A by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Rovner, Philip)
June 18, 2010 540 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Thomas P. Preston regarding courtesy copies of Facebook's pending motions pursuant to the Court's June 10, 2010 Order - re 522 Order Cancelling Deadline, Set Deadlines/Hearings, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines,,,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Preston, Thomas)
June 18, 2010 REDACTION NOTICE: In accordance with section G of the Administrative Procedures Governing Filing and Service by Electronic Means, redacted versions of sealed documents shall be filed electronically within 7 days of the filing of the sealed document. The records of this case do not reflect the filing of a redacted version of DI # 517 . (nms)
June 18, 2010 REDACTION NOTICE: In accordance with section G of the Administrative Procedures Governing Filing and Service by Electronic Means, redacted versions of sealed documents shall be filed electronically within 7 days of the filing of the sealed document. The records of this case do not reflect the filing ofredacted versions of DI # 500 , 502 , 504 , and 506 . (nms)
June 17, 2010 Remark: Oral Order regarding discovery letters regenerated to all counsel of record. (rpg)
June 17, 2010 Featured Case ORAL ORDER by Judge Leonard P. Stark: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that counsel for Facebook Inc. shall shall file with the Court a letter, not to exceed three (3) pages, outlining the discovery issues in dispute and its position on those issues on Friday, 6/18/2010. Leader Technologies Inc. shall then file a letter by on Monday, June 21, 2010, not to exceed three (3) pages, outlining its reasons for its opposition. Should any document(s) be filed under seal, a copy of the sealed document(s) must be provided to the Magistrate Judge within one (1) hour of e-filing the document(s). Should the Court find further briefing necessary, the Court will order it. (rpg) Modified on 6/17/2010 (rpg). Modified on 6/22/2010 (rpg).
June 14, 2010 539 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction (dlk)
June 11, 2010 538 SEALED EXHIBIT re 537 Declaration, of Kathryn Robinson in Support of Defendant Facebook's Response to Leader Technologies, Inc.'s Counterstatements to Facebook's Motions for Summary Judgment (Exhibits 2-7) by Facebook Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Caponi, Steven)
June 11, 2010 537 DECLARATION re 529 Reply Brief, 528 Reply Brief, 534 Reply Brief, 533 Reply Brief, 531 Reply Brief, 536 Reply Brief, by Facebook Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 8, # 3 Exhibit 9)(Caponi, Steven)
June 11, 2010 536 SEALED REPLY BRIEF re 408 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Validity of U.S. Patent No. 7,139,761 Based on Anticipation Under 35 U.S.C. Section 102(b) MOTION for Summary Judgment of Validity of U.S. Patent No. 7,139,761 Based on Anticipation Under 35 U.S.C. Section 102(b) filed by Facebook Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Caponi, Steven)
June 11, 2010 535 REDACTED VERSION of 512 Statement PUBLIC VERSION OF PLAINTIFF LEADER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S COUNTER-STATEMENT OF DISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS TO FACEBOOK'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INVALIDITY BASED ON ANTICIPATION UNDER 35 U.S.C. SECTION 102(b) (MOTION NO. 6 OF 6) by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Rovner, Philip)
June 11, 2010 534 SEALED REPLY BRIEF re 403 MOTION for Summary Judgment No. 5 of Invalidity of U.S. Patent No. 7,139,761 Based on teh On-Sale Bar filed by Facebook Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Caponi, Steven)
June 11, 2010 533 SEALED REPLY BRIEF re 394 MOTION for Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 7,139,761 filed by Facebook Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Caponi, Steven)
June 11, 2010 532 REDACTED VERSION of 511 Statement PUBLIC VERSION OF PLAINTIFF LEADER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S COUNTER-STATEMENT OF DISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT FACEBOOK'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INVALIDITY (MOTION NO. 5 OF 6) by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-C)(Rovner, Philip)
June 11, 2010 531 SEALED REPLY BRIEF re 389 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement filed by Facebook Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Caponi, Steven)
June 11, 2010 530 REDACTED VERSION of 510 Statement PUBLIC VERSION OF LEADER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S COUNTER-STATEMENT OF DISPUTED FACTS TO FACEBOOK, INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NO WILLFUL INFRINGEMENT (MOTION NO. 4 OF 6) by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Rovner, Philip)
June 11, 2010 529 SEALED REPLY BRIEF re 385 MOTION for Summary Judgment Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement and No Damages filed by Facebook Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Caponi, Steven)
June 11, 2010 528 REPLY BRIEF re 382 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of Claims 1, 4, 7, 21, 23, 25 31 and 32 of U.S. Patent No. 7,139,761 filed by Facebook Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Caponi, Steven)
June 11, 2010 527 REDACTED VERSION of 509 Statement PUBLIC VERSION OF PLAINTIFF LEADER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S COUNTER-STATEMENT OF DISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS TO FACEBOOK, INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT (MOTION NO. 3 OF 6) by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Rovner, Philip)
June 11, 2010 526 REDACTED VERSION of 508 Statement PUBLIC VERSION OF PLAINTIFF LEADER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S COUNTER-STATEMENT OF DISPUTED FACTS TO FACEBOOK, INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT AND NO DAMAGES (MOTION NO. 2 OF 6) by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Rovner, Philip)
June 11, 2010 525 REDACTED VERSION of 513 Statement PUBLIC VERSION OF LEADER'S COUNTER-STATEMENT OF DISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS TO FACEBOOK'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INVALIDITY (MOTION NO. 1 OF 6) by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Rovner, Philip)
June 11, 2010 524 SEALED STATEMENT re 500 Response to Motion PLAINTIFF LEADER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT FACEBOOK, INC.'S COUNTERSTATEMENT OF DISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS RELATED TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT WITH EXHIBIT A by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Rovner, Philip)
June 11, 2010 523 Transcript of Teleconference held on 8/20/2009 before Judge Stark. Court Reporter/Transcriber Hawkins Reporting. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/2/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/12/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/9/2010. (maw)
June 10, 2010 522 Featured Case ORDER Cancelling Previously Scheduled Pretrial Conference/Jury Trial and Resetting Hearings: ( Jury Trial reset for 7/19/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2A before Judge Leonard P. Stark, and Pretrial Conference set for 7/1/2010 02:30 PM in Courtroom 6C before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Parties are directed to see Order for details regarding courtesy copies to the Court ). Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 6/10/2010. (rpg)
June 9, 2010 521 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Steven L. Caponi regarding 32 Pending Motions To Be Resolved. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Caponi, Steven)
June 9, 2010 520 Letter to THE HONORABLE LEONARD P. STARK from PHILIP A. ROVNER, ESQ. regarding RE ASSIGNMENT AND PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - re Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge,. (Rovner, Philip)
June 9, 2010 519 Official Transcript of Scheduling Conference held on 06-02-10 before Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leonard A. Dibbs. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/30/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/12/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/7/2010. (lad)
June 8, 2010 518 Official Transcript of Teleconference held on 04-27-10 before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter/Transcriber Deanna Warner. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/29/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/9/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/7/2010. (lad)
June 8, 2010 CORRECTING ENTRY: The main document for D.I. 505 has been replaced per counsel's request. The new version correctly references sealed exhibits that relate to the filing (D.I. 506). (nms)
June 7, 2010 Featured Case CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Facebook Inc.,and Leader Technologies Inc.. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Leonard P. Stark. ORDERED by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 6/7/2010 per letter dated June 7, 2010 from parties advising consent to Magistrate Judge Stark for all pending motions, trial, and all post-trial proceedings. (dlk)
June 7, 2010 517 SEALED REPLY BRIEF re 378 MOTION for Objection to Magistrate Judge Stark's April 27 Order re Telephone Conference, filed by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Caponi, Steven) (nms). Modified on 6/8/2010 (nms).
June 7, 2010 516 REDACTED VERSION of 474 DECLARATION OF SEAN M. BOYLE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF LEADER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT FACEBOOK INC.'S OBJECTIONS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE STARK'S APRIL 27, 2010 ORDER, by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Rovner, Philip) Modified on 6/8/2010 (nms).
June 7, 2010 515 REDACTED VERSION of 473 RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT FACEBOOK INC.'S OBJECTIONS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE STARK'S APRIL 27, 2010 ORDER, by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Rovner, Philip) Modified on 6/8/2010 (nms).
June 7, 2010 514 Joint Letter to THE HONORABLE JOSEPH J. FARNAN, JR. from PHILIP A. ROVNER, ESQ. regarding RESPONSE TO COURT INQUIRY RE MAGISTRATE STARK - re Status Conference,,. (Rovner, Philip)
June 4, 2010 513 SEALED COUNTER-STATEMENT re 382 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of Claims 1, 4, 7, 21, 23, 25 31 and 32 of U.S. Patent No. 7,139,761, by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Rovner, Philip) Modified on 6/7/2010 (nms).
June 4, 2010 512 SEALED COUNTER-STATEMENT re 408 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Validity of U.S. Patent No. 7,139,761 Based on Anticipation Under 35 U.S.C. Section 102(b), by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Rovner, Philip) Modified on 6/7/2010 (nms).
June 4, 2010 511 SEALED COUNTER-STATEMENT re 403 MOTION for Summary Judgment No. 5 of Invalidity of U.S. Patent No. 7,139,761 Based on the On-Sale Bar, by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Rovner, Philip) Modified on 6/7/2010 (nms).
June 4, 2010 510 SEALED COUNTER-STATEMENT re 394 MOTION for Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 7,139,761,by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Rovner, Philip) Modified on 6/7/2010 (nms).
June 4, 2010 509 SEALED COUNTER-STATEMENT re 389 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement, by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Rovner, Philip) Modified on 6/7/2010 (nms).
June 4, 2010 508 SEALED COUNTER-STATEMENT re 385 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement and No Damages, by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Rovner, Philip) Modified on 6/7/2010 (nms).
June 4, 2010 507 NOTICE to Take Deposition of David Scott Ehlers on June 8, 2010 by Facebook Inc..(Caponi, Steven)
June 4, 2010 506 SEALED EXHIBITS re 505 Declaration of Melissa H. Keyes in Support of Memorandum in Support of Motion In Limine No. 12, by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Caponi, Steven) Modified on 6/7/2010 (nms). (nms).
June 4, 2010 505 DECLARATION of Melissa H. Keyes re 504 MEMORANDUM in Support re 503 MOTION in Limine No. 12, by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Caponi, Steven) Modified on 6/7/2010 (nms). (nms).
June 4, 2010 504 SEALED MEMORANDUM re 503 MOTION in Limine No. 12, filed by Facebook Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 6/21/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Caponi, Steven) (nms). Modified on 6/7/2010 (nms).
June 4, 2010 503 MOTION in Limine No. 12 - filed by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Caponi, Steven) Modified on 6/7/2010 (nms).
June 4, 2010 502 SEALED EXHIBITS re 501 Declaration, by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Caponi, Steven) (nms). Modified on 6/7/2010 (nms).
June 4, 2010 501 DECLARATION of Melissa H. Keyes re 500 Sealed Counter-Statement of Disputed Material Facts, by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven) Modified on 6/7/2010 (nms).
June 4, 2010 500 SEALED Counter-Statement of Disputed Material Facts re 395 MOTION for Summary Judgment OF FACEBOOK'S FALSE MARKING COUNTERCLAIM, filed by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Caponi, Steven) (nms). Modified on 6/7/2010 (nms).
June 3, 2010 499 REDACTED VERSION of 469 Declaration OF MICHAEL LEE IN SUPPORT OF LEADER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S OPPOSITION TO FACEBOOK INC.'S MOTIONS TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF LEADER'S E XPERTS GIOVANNI VIGNA, JAMES HERBSLEB AND RUSSELL PARR WITH EXHIBITS 1-9, by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Rovner, Philip) Modified on 6/4/2010 (nms).
June 3, 2010 498 REDACTED VERSION of 468 Answering Brief in Opposition MOTIONS TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF LEADER'S EXPERTS GIOVANNI VIGNA, JAMES HERBSLEB AND RUSSELL PARR, by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Rovner, Philip) Modified on 6/4/2010 (nms).
June 3, 2010 497 REDACTED VERSION of 467 Declaration OF JAMES HANNAH IN SUPPORT OF LEADER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S OPPOSITIONS TO FACEBOOK, INC.'S MOTIONS IN LIMINE NOS. 1-11, (VOLUME II, EXHIBITS 6-34), by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Rovner, Philip) Modified on 6/4/2010 (nms).
June 3, 2010 496 REDACTED VERSION of 466 Declaration OF JAMES HANNAH IN SUPPORT OF LEADER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S OPPOSITIONS TO FACEBOOK, INC.'S MOTIONS IN LIMINE NOS. 1-11, (VOLUME I, EXHIBITS), by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Rovner, Philip) Modified on 6/4/2010 (nms).
June 3, 2010 495 REDACTED VERSION of 465 Answering Brief in Opposition MOTIONS IN LIMINE NOS. 1-11, by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Rovner, Philip) Modified on 6/4/2010 (nms).
June 3, 2010 494 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Facebook, Inc.'s Amended Notice of Deposition of Tudor Ventures for June 7, 2010 by Facebook Inc..(Caponi, Steven)
June 3, 2010 493 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Facebook, Inc.'s Amended Notice of Deposition of Michael Solondz for June 9, 2010 by Facebook Inc..(Caponi, Steven)
June 3, 2010 492 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Facebook, Inc.'s Amended Notice of Deposition of Michael Berman for June 8, 2010 by Facebook Inc..(Caponi, Steven)
June 3, 2010 491 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Facebook, Inc.'s Amended Notice of Deposition of Scott S. Moule for June 7, 2010 by Facebook Inc..(Caponi, Steven)
June 3, 2010 490 REDACTED VERSION of 464 Exhibits 1, 7-25 and 27-28 to Robinson Declaration, by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven) Modified on 6/4/2010 (nms).
June 3, 2010 489 REDACTED VERSION of 462 Answering Brief in Opposition, to Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude Testimony in Its Entirety of Facebook's Experts James Hughes and Kimberly Felix by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven)
June 3, 2010 488 REDACTED VERSION of 461 Answering Brief in Opposition, to Plaintiff's Motion In Limine No. 7 Regarding References to a Potential Injunction by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven)
June 3, 2010 487 REDACTED VERSION of 460 Answering Brief in Opposition, to Plaintiff's Motion In Limine No. 6 Regarding a "Product-to-Product Comparison" by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven)
June 3, 2010 486 REDACTED VERSION of 459 Answering Brief in Opposition, to Plaintiff's Motion In Limine No. 5 Regarding On-Sale Bar by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven)
June 3, 2010 485 REDACTED VERSION of 458 Answering Brief in Opposition, to Plaintiff's Motion In Limine No. 4 to Exclude Evidence of Reexamination of the '761 Patent by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven)
June 3, 2010 484 REDACTED VERSION of 457 Answering Brief in Opposition, to Plaintiff's Motion In Limine No. 3 Regarding Non-Infringing Alternatives and License Agreements by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven)
June 3, 2010 483 REDACTED VERSION of 456 Answering Brief in Opposition, to Plaintiff's Motion In Limine No. 2 to Exclude Portions of Expert Testimony of Michael Kearns by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven)
June 3, 2010 482 REDACTED VERSION of 455 Answering Brief in Opposition, to Plaintiff's Motion In Limine No. 1 to Exclude Portions of Expert Testimony of Saul Greenberg by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven)
June 2, 2010 481 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Facebook, Inc.'s Amended Notice of Deposition of Zacks Law Group Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30 by Facebook Inc..(Caponi, Steven)
June 2, 2010 Remark: Per Conference held June 2, 2010, the Pretrial Conference set for June 3, 2010 at 10:00 a.m. is CANCELLED. The Pretrial Conference will be rescheduled for a date to be determined. (dlk)
June 2, 2010 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. - Status Conference held on 6/2/2010. The Court directed to parties to advise by 6/7/2010 if consent will be given to Magistrate Judge Stark presiding over the trial. If the parties do not consent to Magistrate Judge Stark then a decision will be reached by 6/10/2010, as to which Article III judge will preside. The pre-trial conference set for 6/3/2010 is postponed until decision is reached on the who will preside. (Court Reporter Leonard Dibbs.) (nms)
June 1, 2010 480 REPLY BRIEF re 377 MOTION to Redact 344 Transcript, of Hearing of April 9, 2010 in Support of Motion for Redaction of Electronic Transcript of Hearing on April 9, 2010 filed by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven)
June 1, 2010 479 Letter to The Honorable Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. From Philip A. Rovner, Esq. Regarding Enclosing Courtesy Copies of Joint Proposed Preliminary Jury Instructions; Joint Proposed Jury Instructions; Leader's Proposed Special Verdict Form and Leader's Proposed Voir Dire Questions (see 477 Proposed Jury Instructions, 475 Proposed Voir Dire, 476 Verdict Sheet, 478 Proposed Jury Instructions). (Rovner, Philip) Modified on 6/2/2010 (nms).
June 1, 2010 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 375 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Adam Pivovar filed by Facebook Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 6/1/2010. (rpg)
May 28, 2010 478 Proposed Jury Instructions, by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 PART 2, # 2 PART 3, # 3 PART 4)(Rovner, Philip) Modified on 6/1/2010 (nms).
May 28, 2010 477 Proposed Jury Instructions by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Rovner, Philip)
May 28, 2010 476 PROPOSED Special Verdict Form, by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Rovner, Philip) Modified on 6/1/2010 (nms).
May 28, 2010 475 Proposed Voir Dire by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Rovner, Philip)
May 28, 2010 474 SEALED DECLARATION re 473 Answering Brief in Opposition, DECLARATION OF SEAN M. BOYLE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF LEADER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT FACEBOOK INC.'S OBJECTIONS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE STARK'S APRIL 27, 2010 ORDER WITH EXHIBITS 1-4 by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Rovner, Philip)
May 28, 2010 473 SEALED ANSWERING BRIEF/Response re 378 Objections to Magistrate Judge Stark's April 27 Order (re Telephone Conference), filed by Leader Technologies Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 6/7/2010. (Rovner, Philip) Modified on 6/1/2010 (nms).
May 28, 2010 472 PROPOSED Special Verdict Form, by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven) Modified on 6/1/2010 (nms).
May 28, 2010 471 Proposed Voir Dire by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven)
May 27, 2010 470 JOINT Proposed Pretrial Order, by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A1, # 2 Exhibit A2, # 3 Exhibit B1, # 4 Exhibit B2, # 5 Exhibit B3, PART 1, # 6 Exhibit B3, PART 2, # 7 Exhibit C1, # 8 Exhibit C2, # 9 Exhibit C3, # 10 Exhibit D1, # 11 Exhibit D2, # 12 Exhibit E1, # 13 Exhibit E2)(Rovner, Philip) Modified on 6/1/2010 (nms).
May 27, 2010 469 SEALED DECLARATION of Michael Lee re 468 Answering Brief in Opposition re MOTIONS TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF LEADER'S EXPERTS GIOVANNI VIGNA, JAMES HERBSLEB AND RUSSELL PARR (EXHIBITS 1-9), by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Rovner, Philip) Modified on 6/1/2010 (nms).
May 27, 2010 468 SEALED ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 412 MOTION in Limine TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF LEADER'S EXPERTS GIOVANNI VIGNA, JAMES HERBSLEB AND RUSSELL PARR, filed by Leader Technologies Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 6/7/2010. (Rovner, Philip) Modified on 6/1/2010 (nms).
May 27, 2010 467 SEALED DECLARATION of James Hannah re 465 Answering Brief in Opposition re MOTIONS IN LIMINE NOS. 1-11, (VOLUME 2, EXHIBITS 6-34<), by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Rovner, Philip) Modified on 6/1/2010 (nms).
May 27, 2010 466 SEALED DECLARATION of James Hannah re 465 Answering Brief in Opposition re MOTIONS IN LIMINE NOS. 1-11 (VOLUME 1, EXHIBITS 1-5), by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Rovner, Philip) Modified on 6/1/2010 (nms).
May 27, 2010 465 SEALED ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 412 MOTION in Limine NOS. 1-11, filed by Leader Technologies Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 6/7/2010. (Rovner, Philip) Modified on 6/1/2010 (nms).
May 27, 2010 464 SEALED EXHIBITS re 463 Declaration, by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1, 7-25 and 27-28)(Caponi, Steven) (nms). Modified on 6/1/2010 (nms).
May 27, 2010 463 DECLARATION of Kathryn Robinson in Support of Defendant Facebook's Opposition to Leader Technologies, Inc.'s Pretrial Motions, by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2, # 2 Exhibit 3, # 3 Exhibit 4 - Part 1, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Part 2, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 26)(Caponi, Steven) Modified on 6/1/2010 (nms).
May 27, 2010 462 SEALED ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 426 MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY IN ITS ENTIRETY OF FACEBOOK'S EXPERTS JAMES HUGHES AND KIMBERLY FELIX, filed by Facebook Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 6/7/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Caponi, Steven) (nms). Modified on 6/1/2010 (nms).
May 27, 2010 461 SEALED ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 423 MOTION in Limine NO. 7 TO EXCLUDE REFERENCES TO A POTENTIAL INJUNCTION, filed by Facebook Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 6/7/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Caponi, Steven) (nms). Modified on 6/1/2010 (nms).
May 27, 2010 460 SEALED ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 422 MOTION in Limine NO. 6 TO EXCLUDE A PRODUCT-TO-PRODUCT COMPARISON, filed by Facebook Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 6/7/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Caponi, Steven) (nms). Modified on 6/1/2010 (nms).
May 27, 2010 459 SEALED ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 421 MOTION in Limine NO. 5 TO EXCLUDE ON-SALE AND PUBLIC DISCLOSURE DEFENSE, filed by Facebook Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 6/7/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Caponi, Steven) (nms). Modified on 6/1/2010 (nms).
May 27, 2010 458 SEALED ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 420 MOTION in Limine NO. 4 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF REEXAMINATION, filed by Facebook Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 6/7/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Caponi, Steven) (nms). Modified on 6/1/2010 (nms).
May 27, 2010 457 SEALED ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 419 SEALED MOTION in Limine NO. 3 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF FACEBOOK'S SETTLEMENT AGREEMENTS AND EXPERT TESTIMONY REGARDING POTENTIAL DESIGN AROUNDS OR NON-INFRINGING ALTERNATIVES, filed by Facebook Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 6/7/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Caponi, Steven) (nms). Modified on 6/1/2010 (nms)
May 27, 2010 456 SEALED ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 418 SEALED MOTION in Limine NO. 2 TO EXCLUDE PORTIONS OF EXPERT TESTIMONY OF MICHAEL KEARNS, filed by Facebook Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 6/7/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Caponi, Steven) (nms). Modified on 6/1/2010 (nms).
May 27, 2010 455 SEALED ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 417 SEALED MOTION in Limine NO. 1 TO EXCLUDE PORTIONS OF EXPERT TESTIMONY OF SAUL GREENBERG, filed by Facebook Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 6/7/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Caponi, Steven) (nms). Modified on 6/1/2010 (nms).
May 27, 2010 454 REDACTED VERSION of 381 Exhibits A-K re 380 Declaration of Jeffrey Norberg in Support of Defendant Facebook Inc.'s Objections to Magistrate Judge Stark's April 27, 2010 Order, by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven) Modified on 6/1/2010 (nms).
May 27, 2010 453 REDACTED VERSION of 380 Declaration of Jeffrey Norberg re 379 MEMORANDUM in Support in Support of Defendant Facebook Inc.'s Objections to Magistrate Judge Stark's April 27, 2010 Order by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven)
May 27, 2010 452 REDACTED VERSION of 379 MEMORANDUM in Support re 378 MOTION for Objection to Magistrate Judge Stark's April 27 Order by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven)
May 27, 2010 451 REDACTED VERSION of 414 Exhibits 1-22, 25 and 28 to Declaration of Melissa Keyes in Support of Defendant Facebook, Inc.'s Motion in Limine and Daubert Motions, by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven) Modified on 6/1/2010 (nms).
May 27, 2010 450 REDACTED VERSION of 416 Opening Brief in Support of Defendant Facebook, Inc.'s Daubert Motions by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven)
May 27, 2010 449 REDACTED VERSION of 415 Opening Brief in Support of Defendant Facebook, Inc.'s Motions in Limine by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven)
May 26, 2010 448 REDACTED VERSION of 428 Declaration PUBLIC VERSION OF DECLARATION OF LISA KOBIALKA IN SUPPORT OF LEADER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S DAUBERT MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY IN ITS ENTIRETY OF FACEBOOK'S EXPERTS JAMES HUGHES AND KIMBERLY FELIX, VOLUME II, EXHIBITS 2-10 by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2-10)(Rovner, Philip)
May 26, 2010 447 REDACTED VERSION of 427 Declaration PUBLIC VERSION OF DECLARATION OF LISA KOBIALKA IN SUPPORT OF LEADER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S DAUBERT MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY IN ITS ENTIRETY OF FACEBOOK'S EXPERTS JAMES HUGHES AND KIMBERLY FELIX, VOLUME 1, EXHIBIT 1 by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-PART 1, # 2 Exhibit 1-PART 2, # 3 Exhibit 1-PART 3, # 4 Exhibit 1-PART 4, # 5 Exhibit 1-PART 5, # 6 Exhibit 1-PART 6, # 7 Exhibit 1-PART 7, # 8 Exhibit 1-PART 8, # 9 Exhibit 1-PART 9, # 10 Exhibit 1-PART 10)(Rovner, Philip)
May 26, 2010 446 REDACTED VERSION of 425 Declaration,,, PUBLIC VERSION OF DECLARATION OF PAUL J. ANDRE IN SUPPORT OF LEADER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S MOTIONS IN LIMINE NOS. 1-7, VOLUME II, EXHIBITS 8-23 by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 8-12, # 2 Exhibit 13-17, # 3 Exhibit 18-23)(Rovner, Philip)
May 26, 2010 445 REDACTED VERSION of 424 Declaration,,, PUBLIC VERSION OF DECLARATION OF PAUL J. ANDRE IN SUPPORT OF LEADER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S MOTIONS IN LIMINE NOS. 1-7, VOLUME I, EXHIBITS 1-7 by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-7)(Rovner, Philip)
May 26, 2010 444 REDACTED VERSION of 419 SEALED MOTION in Limine LEADER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF FACEBOOK'S SETTLEMENT AGREEMENTS AND EXPERT TESTIMONY REGARDING POTENTIAL DESIGN AROUNDS OR NON-INFRINGING ALTERNATIVES, WITH EXHIBIT A by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Rovner, Philip)
May 26, 2010 443 REDACTED VERSION of 418 SEALED MOTION in Limine LEADER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 TO EXCLUDE PORTIONS OF EXPERT TESTIMONY OF MICHAEL KEARNS by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Rovner, Philip)
May 26, 2010 442 REDACTED VERSION of 417 SEALED MOTION in Limine LEADER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 TO EXCLUDE PORTIONS OF EXPERT TESTIMONY OF SAUL GREENBERG by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Rovner, Philip)
May 24, 2010 REDACTION NOTICE: In accordance with section G of the Administrative Procedures Governing Filing and Service by Electronic Means, redacted versions of sealed documents shall be filed electronically within 7 days of the filing of the sealed document. The records of this case do not reflect the filing of redacted versions of DI # 379 , 380 , and 381 . (nms)
May 21, 2010 441 REDACTED VERSION of 402 Declaration Of Ryan Hopkins in Support of Plaintiff Leader Technologies, Inc.'S Motion for Summary Judgment of Facebook's False Marking Counterclaim, by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-F, # 2 Exhibits G-M)(Rovner, Philip) Modified on 5/24/2010 (nms).
May 21, 2010 440 REDACTED VERSION of 400 Statement Of Undisputed Material Facts in Support of Plaintiff Leader Technologies, Inc.'S Motion for Summary Judgment of Facebook's False Marking Counterclaim, by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Rovner, Philip) Modified on 5/24/2010 (nms).
May 21, 2010 439 REDACTED VERSION of 397 Opening Brief in Support re MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF FACEBOOK'S FALSE MARKING COUNTERCLAIM, by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Rovner, Philip) Modified on 5/24/2010 (nms).
May 21, 2010 438 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 377 MOTION to Redact 344 Transcript of Hearing of April 9, 2010, filed by Leader Technologies Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 6/1/2010. (Rovner, Philip) Modified on 5/24/2010 (nms).
May 21, 2010 437 REDACTED VERSION of 330 Exhibit A to Keyes Declaration, by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven) Modified on 5/24/2010 (nms).
May 21, 2010 436 REDACTED VERSION of 407 Exhibits 1-6 and 10-14 re 406 Declaration re 403 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of U.S. Patent No. 7,139,761 Based on teh On-Sale Bar, by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven) Modified on 5/24/2010 (nms).
May 21, 2010 435 REDACTED VERSION of 405 MEMORANDUM in Support re 403 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of U.S. Patent No. 7,139,761 Based on teh On-Sale Bar, by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven) Modified on 5/24/2010 (nms).
May 21, 2010 434 REDACTED VERSION of 401 Exhibits 1-9 re 399 Declaration re 394 MOTION for Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 7,139,761, by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven) Modified on 5/24/2010 (nms).
May 21, 2010 433 REDACTED VERSION of 398 Opening Brief in Support, 394 MOTION for Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 7,139,761 by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven)
May 21, 2010 432 REDACTED VERSION of 393 Exhibits A - I re 392 Declaration re 389 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement, by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven) Modified on 5/24/2010 (nms).
May 21, 2010 431 REDACTED VERSION of 391 Opening Brief in Support re 389 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement, by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven) Modified on 5/24/2010 (nms).
May 21, 2010 430 REDACTED VERSION of 388 Exhibits B and C re 387 Declaration re 385 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement and No Damages, by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven) Modified on 5/24/2010 (nms).
May 21, 2010 429 REDACTED VERSION of 411 MEMORANDUM in Support, 385 MOTION for Summary Judgment Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement and No Damages by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven)
May 20, 2010 428 SEALED DECLARATION of Lisa Kobialka re 426 MOTION To Exclude Testimony in its Entirety of Facebook's Experts James Hughes and Kimberly Felix (VOLUME 2, EXHIBIT 2-10), by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Rovner, Philip) Modified on 5/21/2010 (nms).
May 20, 2010 427 SEALED DECLARATION of Lisa Kobialka re 426 MOTION TOTo Exclude Testimony in its Entirety of Facebook's Experts James Hughes and Kimberly Felix, (VOLUME 1, EXHIBIT 1), by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Rovner, Philip) Modified on 5/21/2010 (nms).
May 20, 2010 426 MOTION To Exclude Testimony in its Entirety of Facebook's Experts James Hughes and Kimberly Felix - filed by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Rovner, Philip) Modified on 5/21/2010 (nms).
May 20, 2010 425 SEALED DECLARATION OF Paul J. Andre (VOLUME 2, EXHIBITS 8-23) re 422 MOTION in Limine NO. 6 TO EXCLUDE A PRODUCT-TO-PRODUCT COMPARISON, 417 SEALED MOTION in Limine NO. 1 TO EXCLUDE PORTIONS OF EXPERT TESTIMONY OF SAUL GREENBERG, 418 SEALED MOTION in Limine NO. 2 TO EXCLUDE PORTIONS OF EXPERT TESTIMONY OF MICHAEL KEARNS, 420 MOTION in Limine NO. 4 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF REEXAMINATION, 419 SEALED MOTION in Limine NO. 3 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF FACEBOOK'S SETTLEMENT AGREEMENTS AND EXPERT TESTIMONY REGARDING POTENTIAL DESIGN AROUNDS OR NON-INFRINGING ALTERNATIVES, 421 MOTION in Limine NO. 5 TO EXCLUDE ON-SALE AND PUBLIC DISCLOSURE DEFENSE, 423 MOTION in Limine NO. 7 TO EXCLUDE REFERENCES TO A POTENTIAL INJUNCTION, by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Rovner, Philip) Modified on 5/21/2010 (nms).
May 20, 2010 424 SEALED DECLARATION Of Paul J. Andre re 422 MOTION in Limine NO. 6 TO EXCLUDE A PRODUCT-TO-PRODUCT COMPARISON, 417 SEALED MOTION in Limine NO. 1 TO EXCLUDE PORTIONS OF EXPERT TESTIMONY OF SAUL GREENBERG, 418 SEALED MOTION in Limine NO. 2 TO EXCLUDE PORTIONS OF EXPERT TESTIMONY OF MICHAEL KEARNS, 420 MOTION in Limine NO. 4 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF REEXAMINATION, 419 SEALED MOTION in Limine NO. 3 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF FACEBOOK'S SETTLEMENT AGREEMENTS AND EXPERT TESTIMONY REGARDING POTENTIAL DESIGN AROUNDS OR NON-INFRINGING ALTERNATIVES, 421 MOTION in Limine NO. 5 TO EXCLUDE ON-SALE AND PUBLIC DISCLOSURE DEFENSE, 423 MOTION in Limine NO. 7 TO EXCLUDE REFERENCES TO A POTENTIAL INJUNCTION (VOLUME 1, EXHIBITS 1-7) by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Rovner, Philip) Modified on 5/21/2010 (nms).
May 20, 2010 423 MOTION in Limine NO. 7 To Exclude References to a Potential Injunction - filed by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Rovner, Philip) Modified on 5/21/2010 (nms).
May 20, 2010 422 MOTION in Limine NO. 6 To Exclude a Product-to-Product Comparison - filed by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Rovner, Philip) Modified on 5/21/2010 (nms).
May 20, 2010 421 MOTION in Limine NO. 5 To Exclude On-sale and Public Disclosure Defense - filed by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Rovner, Philip) Modified on 5/21/2010 (nms).
May 20, 2010 420 MOTION in Limine NO. 4 To Exclude Evidence of Reexamination - filed by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Rovner, Philip) Modified on 5/21/2010 (nms).
May 20, 2010 419 SEALED MOTION in Limine NO. 3 To Exclude Evidence of Facebook's Settlement Agreements and Expert Testimony Regarding Potential Design Arounds or Non-infringing Alternatives - filed by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Rovner, Philip) Modified on 5/21/2010 (nms).
May 20, 2010 418 SEALED MOTION in Limine NO. 2 To Exclude Portions of Expert Testimony of Michael Kearns - filed by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Rovner, Philip) Modified on 5/21/2010 (nms).
May 20, 2010 417 SEALED MOTION in Limine NO. 1 To Exclude Portions of Expert Testimony of Saul Greenberg - filed by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Rovner, Philip) Modified on 5/21/2010 (nms).
May 20, 2010 416 SEALED OPENING BRIEF in Support re 412 MOTION in Limine and Daubert Motion filed by Facebook Inc.(a Delaware corporation).Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 6/7/2010. (Caponi, Steven) (nms).
May 20, 2010 415 SEALED OPENING BRIEF in Support re 412 MOTION in Limine and Daubert Motion filed by Facebook Inc.(a Delaware corporation).Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 6/7/2010. (Caponi, Steven) (nms).
May 20, 2010 414 SEALED EXHIBITS 1-22, 25 and 28 re 413 Declaration, by Facebook Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Caponi, Steven) (nms). Modified on 5/21/2010 (nms).
May 20, 2010 413 DECLARATION re 412 MOTION in Limine and Daubert Motion by Facebook Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 23, # 2 Exhibit 24, # 3 Exhibit 26, # 4 Exhibit 27, # 5 Exhibit 29, # 6 Exhibit 30)(Caponi, Steven)
May 20, 2010 412 MOTION in Limine and Daubert Motion - filed by Facebook Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caponi, Steven)
May 14, 2010 411 SEALED MEMORANDUM in Support re 385 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement and No Damages, filed by Facebook Inc.(a Delaware corporation).Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 6/1/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Caponi, Steven) (nms). Modified on 5/17/2010 (nms).
May 14, 2010 410 MEMORANDUM in Support re 408 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Validity of U.S. Patent No. 7,139,761 Based on Anticipation Under 35 U.S.C. Section 102(b), filed by Facebook Inc.(a Delaware corporation).Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 6/1/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B - Part 1, # 3 Exhibit B - Part 2, # 4 Exhibit C)(Caponi, Steven) Modified on 5/17/2010 (nms).
May 14, 2010 409 STATEMENT re 408 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Validity of U.S. Patent No. 7,139,761 Based on Anticipation Under 35 U.S.C. Section 102(b), by Facebook Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Caponi, Steven) Modified on 5/17/2010 (nms).
May 14, 2010 408 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Validity of U.S. Patent No. 7,139,761 Based on Anticipation Under 35 U.S.C. Section 102(b) - filed by Facebook Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Caponi, Steven) Modified on 5/17/2010 (nms).
May 14, 2010 407 SEALED EXHIBIT re 406 Declaration,, 403 MOTION for Summary Judgment No. 5 of Invalidity of U.S. Patent No. 7,139,761 Based on teh On-Sale Bar, by Facebook Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-6 and 10-14)(Caponi, Steven) (nms). Modified on 5/17/2010 (nms).
May 14, 2010 406 DECLARATION of Elizabeth Stameshkin re 403 MOTION for Summary Judgment No. 5 of Invalidity of U.S. Patent No. 7,139,761 Based on teh On-Sale Bar , by Facebook Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 7, # 2 Exhibit 8 - part 1, # 3 Exhibit 8 - Part 2, # 4 Exhibit 8 - Part 3, # 5 Exhibit 9)(Caponi, Steven) Modified on 5/17/2010 (nms).
May 14, 2010 405 SEALED MEMORANDUM in Support re 403 MOTION for Summary Judgment No. 5 of Invalidity of U.S. Patent No. 7,139,761 Based on teh On-Sale Bar, filed by Facebook Inc.(a Delaware corporation).Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 6/1/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Caponi, Steven) (nms). Modified on 5/17/2010 (nms).
May 14, 2010 404 STATEMENT re 403 MOTION for Summary Judgment No. 5 of Invalidity of U.S. Patent No. 7,139,761 Based on teh On-Sale Bar Certification by Facebook Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Caponi, Steven)
May 14, 2010 403 MOTION for Summary Judgment No. 5 of Invalidity of U.S. Patent No. 7,139,761 Based on the On-Sale Bar - filed by Facebook Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Caponi, Steven) Modified on 5/17/2010 (nms).
May 14, 2010 402 SEALED DECLARATION of Ryan Hopkins re 395 MOTION for Summary Judgment Of Facebook's False Marking Counterclaim, by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Rovner, Philip) Modified on 5/17/2010 (nms).
May 14, 2010 401 SEALED EXHIBIT re 399 Declaration by Facebook Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Caponi, Steven) (nms).
May 14, 2010 400 SEALED STATEMENT re 395 MOTION for Summary Judgment Of Facebook's False Marking Counterclaim, by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Rovner, Philip) Modified on 5/17/2010 (nms).
May 14, 2010 399 DECLARATION re 394 MOTION for Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 7,139,761 by Facebook Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Caponi, Steven)
May 14, 2010 398 SEALED OPENING BRIEF in Support re 394 MOTION for Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 7,139,761 filed by Facebook Inc.(a Delaware corporation).Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 6/1/2010. (Caponi, Steven) (nms).
May 14, 2010 397 SEALED OPENING BRIEF in Support re 395 MOTION for Summary Judgment Of Facebook's False Marking Counterclaim, filed by Leader Technologies Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 6/1/2010. (Rovner, Philip) Modified on 5/17/2010 (nms).
May 14, 2010 396 STATEMENT re 394 MOTION for Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 7,139,761 by Facebook Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Caponi, Steven)
May 14, 2010 395 MOTION for Summary Judgment Of Facebook's False Marking Counterclaim - filed by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rovner, Philip) Modified on 5/17/2010 (nms).
May 14, 2010 394 MOTION for Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 7,139,761 - filed by Facebook Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caponi, Steven)
May 14, 2010 393 SEALED EXHIBIT re 392 Declaration by Facebook Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Caponi, Steven) (nms).
May 14, 2010 392 DECLARATION re 389 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement by Facebook Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Caponi, Steven)
May 14, 2010 391 SEALED OPENING BRIEF in Support re 389 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement, filed by Facebook Inc.. Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 6/1/2010. (Caponi, Steven) (nms). Modified on 5/17/2010 (nms).
May 14, 2010 390 STATEMENT re 389 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement by Facebook Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Caponi, Steven)
May 14, 2010 389 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement - filed by Facebook Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caponi, Steven)
May 14, 2010 388 SEALED EXHIBITS re 387 Declaration re 385 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement and No Damages, by Facebook Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits B and C)(Caponi, Steven) (nms). Modified on 5/17/2010 (nms).
May 14, 2010 387 DECLARATION of Heidi L. Keefe re 385 MOTION for Summary Judgment Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement and No Damages by Facebook Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Caponi, Steven) Modified on 5/17/2010 (nms).
May 14, 2010 386 STATEMENT re 385 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement and No Damages, by Facebook Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Caponi, Steven) Modified on 5/17/2010 (nms).
May 14, 2010 385 MOTION for Summary Judgment Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement and No Damages - filed by Facebook Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caponi, Steven) Modified on 5/17/2010 (nms).
May 14, 2010 384 MEMORANDUM in Support re 382 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of Claims 1, 4, 7, 21, 23, 25 31 and 32 of U.S. Patent No. 7,139,761, filed by Facebook Inc.(a Delaware corporation).Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 6/1/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Caponi, Steven) Modified on 5/17/2010 (nms).
May 14, 2010 383 STATEMENT re 382 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of Claims 1, 4, 7, 21, 23, 25 31 and 32 of U.S. Patent No. 7,139,761 Certification by Facebook Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Caponi, Steven)
May 14, 2010 382 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of Claims 1, 4, 7, 21, 23, 25 31 and 32 of U.S. Patent No. 7,139,761 - filed by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Caponi, Steven) Modified on 5/17/2010 (nms).
May 11, 2010 381 SEALED EXHIBITS A-K re 380 Declaration of Jeffrey Norberg in Support of Defendant Facebook Inc.'s Objections to Magistrate Judge Stark's April 27, 2010 Order, by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven) Modified on 5/11/2010 (nms). (nms).
May 11, 2010 380 SEALED DECLARATION of Jeffrey Norberg re 379 MEMORANDUM in Support in Support of Defendant Facebook Inc.'s Objections to Magistrate Judge Stark's April 27, 2010 Order, by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven) Modified on 5/11/2010 (nms). (nms).
May 11, 2010 379 SEALED MEMORANDUM in Support re 378 MOTION for Objection to Magistrate Judge Stark's April 27 Order, filed by Facebook Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 5/28/2010. (Caponi, Steven) Modified on 5/11/2010 (nms). (nms).
May 11, 2010 378 MOTION for Objection to Magistrate Judge Stark's April 27 Order - filed by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)Motions referred to Leonard P. Stark.(Caponi, Steven) Modified on 5/11/2010 (nms).
May 10, 2010 Remark: Set Answering Brief Deadline re 377 MOTION to Redact 344 Transcript of Hearing of April 9, 2010. Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 5/24/2010. (nms)
May 7, 2010 377 MOTION to Redact 344 Transcript of Hearing of April 9, 2010 - filed by Facebook Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Proposed Order)Motions referred to Leonard P. Stark.(Caponi, Steven) Modified on 5/10/2010 (nms).
May 6, 2010 376 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Facebook, Inc.'s Amended Notice of Deposition of Jeffrey R. Lamb Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30 by Facebook Inc..(Caponi, Steven)
May 5, 2010 375 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Adam Pivovar - filed by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for motion for admission pro hac vice of Adam Pivovar, # 2 Exhibit Certification of Adam Pivovar)(Caponi, Steven)
May 3, 2010 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 362 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael G. Rhodes filed by Facebook Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/3/10. (ntl)
May 3, 2010 374 REDACTED VERSION of 367 Letter Dated April 26, 2010 from Philip A. Rovner, Esq. To the Honorable Leonard P. Stark, with Exhibits 1-10, by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Rovner, Philip) Modified on 5/4/2010 (nms).
April 29, 2010 373 REDACTED VERSION of 356 Exhibit to a Document, re 355 Declaration of Elizabeth Stameshkin by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven)
April 29, 2010 372 REDACTED VERSION of 354 Exhibit to a Document re 353 Reply Brief in Support of 304 Motion for Leave to Amend Responsive Pleading to Add a Defense and Counterclaim of Inequitable Conduct and the Amend Its False Marking Counterclaim, by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Caponi, Steven) Modified on 4/30/2010 (nms).
April 29, 2010 371 REDACTED VERSION of 353 Reply Brief, re 304 MOTION for Leave to Amend Responsive Pleading to Add a Defense and Counterclaim of Inequitable Conduct and to Amend Its False Marking Counterclaim by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven)
April 29, 2010 370 REDACTED VERSION of 366 Exhibits 1 - 10 to Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Steven L. Caponi, Esq., counsel for Facebook, Inc. regarding Preparation for Teleconference on April 27, 2010, by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven) Modified on 4/30/2010 (nms).
April 29, 2010 369 REDACTED VERSION of 365 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Steven L. Caponi, Esq., counsel for Facebook, Inc. regarding Preparation for Teleconference on April 27, 2010 - re Oral Order by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven)
April 27, 2010 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark - Telephone Conference held on 4/27/2010. (Court Reporter: Deanna Warner - Hawkins Rptg.) (ntl)
April 27, 2010 368 NOTICE to Take Deposition of CHRISTOPHER J. BOKHART on MAY 4, 2010 by Leader Technologies Inc..(Rovner, Philip)
April 26, 2010 367 SEALED Letter to THE HONORABLE LEONARD P. STARK from PHILIP A. ROVNER, ESQ. regarding DISCOVERY DISPUTE LETTER PER ORAL ORDER OF APRIL 23, 2010 - re Oral Order,. (Rovner, Philip)
April 26, 2010 366 SEALED EXHIBIT re 365 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Steven L. Caponi, Esq., counsel for Facebook, Inc. regarding Preparation for Teleconference on April 27, 2010 by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven) (nms).
April 26, 2010 365 SEALED Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Steven L. Caponi, Esq., counsel for Facebook, Inc. regarding Preparation for Teleconference on April 27, 2010 - re Oral Order,. (Caponi, Steven) (nms).
April 23, 2010 364 NOTICE OF SERVICE of DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT TESTIMONY FOR JAMES HERBSLEB, PH.D. PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 26(a(2); REBUTTAL EXPERT DAMAGES REPORT OF RUSSELL L. PARR, CFA, ASA by Leader Technologies Inc..(Rovner, Philip)
April 23, 2010 REDACTION NOTICE: In accordance with section G of the Administrative Procedures Governing Filing and Service by Electronic Means, redacted versions of sealed documents shall be filed electronically within 7 days of the filing of the sealed document. The records of this case do not reflect the filing of a redacted version of DI # 330 . (nms)
April 23, 2010 Featured Case ORAL ORDER by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/23/10: the Court will hold a discovery teleconference on April 27, 2010 at 4:30 p.m. Counsel for the party seeking relief shall initiate the call to 302-573-4573. The parties shall each file 3-page letters no later than 4:30 p.m. on April 26, 2010. (ntl)
April 23, 2010 363 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Expert Report of Christopher J. Bokhart and Expert Report of Michael Kearns, Ph.D by Facebook Inc..(Caponi, Steven)
April 23, 2010 362 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael G. Rhodes - filed by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Certification By Counsel)(Caponi, Steven)
April 22, 2010 361 NOTICE to Take Deposition of MARK ZUCKERBERG on MAY 11, 2010 by Leader Technologies Inc..(Rovner, Philip)
April 22, 2010 360 NOTICE to Take Deposition of KIMBERLY J. FELIX on MAY 5, 2010 by Leader Technologies Inc..(Rovner, Philip)
April 22, 2010 359 NOTICE to Take Deposition of SAUL GREENBERG on APRIL 30, 2010 by Leader Technologies Inc..(Rovner, Philip)
April 22, 2010 358 NOTICE to Take Deposition of MICHAEL KEARNS, PH.D. on MAY 6, 2010 by Leader Technologies Inc..(Rovner, Philip)
April 22, 2010 357 NOTICE to Take Deposition of JAMES PATRICK HUGHES on MAY 1, 2010 by Leader Technologies Inc..(Rovner, Philip)
April 22, 2010 356 SEALED EXHIBITS re 355 Declaration of Elizabeth Stameshkin in Support of 353 Reply Brief in Support of 304 Motion for Leave to Amend Its Responsive Pleading to Add a Defense and Counterclaim of Inequitable Conduct and to Amend Its False Marking Counterclaim, by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven) (nms). Modified on 4/23/2010 (nms).
April 22, 2010 355 DECLARATION of Elizabeth Stameshkin re 353 Reply Brief in Support of 353 Reply Brief in Support of 304 Motion for Leave to Amend Responsive Pleading to Add a Defense and Counterclaim of Inequitable Conduct and to Amend Its False Marking Counterclaim, by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven) Modified on 4/23/2010 (nms).
April 22, 2010 354 SEALED EXHIBIT re 353 Reply Brief in Support of 304 Motion for Leave to Amend Responsive Pleading to Add a Defense and Counterclaim of Inequitable Conduct and the Amend Its False Marking Counterclaim, by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven) (nms). Modified on 4/23/2010 (nms).
April 22, 2010 353 SEALED REPLY BRIEF re 304 MOTION for Leave to Amend Responsive Pleading to Add a Defense and Counterclaim of Inequitable Conduct and to Amend Its False Marking Counterclaim, filed by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven) (nms). Modified on 4/23/2010 (nms).
April 22, 2010 352 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Facebook, Inc.'s Notices of Deposition of James Herbsleb, Giovanni Vigna and Russell Parr by Facebook Inc..(Caponi, Steven)
April 22, 2010 351 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Facebook, Inc.'s Fourth Supplemental Response to Plaintiff Leader Technologies, Inc.'s Interrogatory No. 4 by Facebook Inc..(Caponi, Steven)
April 19, 2010 350 REDACTED VERSION of 334 Declaration of Ryan Hopkins in Support of Plaintiff Leader Technologies, Inc.'S Opposition to Defendant Facebook Inc.'S Motion for Leave to Amend its Responsive Pleading to Add a Defense and Counterclaim of Inequitable Conduct and to Amend its False Marking Counterclaim (VOLUME 2), by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit F-G11, # 2 Exhibit G12-S)(Rovner, Philip) Modified on 4/20/2010 (nms). Modified on 4/20/2010 (nms).
April 19, 2010 349 REDACTED VERSION of 333 Declaration Of Ryan Hopkins in Support of Plaintiff Leader Technologies, Inc.'S Opposition to Defendant Facebook Inc.'S Motion for Leave to Amend its Responsive Pleading to Add a Defense and Counterclaim of Inequitable Conduct and to Amend its False Marking Counterclaim, (VOLUME 1) by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A1-A2, # 2 Exhibit A3, # 3 Exhibit A4-E)(Rovner, Philip) Modified on 4/20/2010 (nms).
April 19, 2010 348 REDACTED VERSION of 332 Declaration Of Michael Mckibben in Support of Opposition to Defendant Facebook Inc.'S Motion for Leave to Amend its Responsive Pleading to Add a Defense and Counterclaim of Inequitable Conduct and to Amend its False Marking Counterclaim, by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Rovner, Philip) Modified on 4/20/2010 (nms).
April 19, 2010 347 REDACTED VERSION of 331 Answering Brief in OppositionTo Motion for Leave to Amend its Responsive Pleading to Add a Defense and Counterclaim of Inequitable Conduct and to Amend its False Marking Counterclaim, by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Rovner, Philip) Modified on 4/20/2010 (nms).
April 19, 2010 346 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Facebook, Inc.'s Third Supplemental Response to Plaintiff Leader Technologies, Inc.'s Interrogatory No. 4 by Facebook Inc..(Caponi, Steven)
April 16, 2010 345 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Expert Reports of Kimberly J. Felix and Saul Greenberg, Ph.D. by Facebook Inc..(Caponi, Steven)
April 16, 2010 344 Official Transcript of Teleconference held on 04-09-10 before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter/Transcriber Heather Triozzi. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/7/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/17/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/15/2010. (lad)
April 15, 2010 343 REDACTED VERSION of 328 Objections by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Unreported Case)(Caponi, Steven)
April 15, 2010 342 REDACTED VERSION of 325 Exhibit to a Document by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-8 redacted in their entirety)(Caponi, Steven)
April 15, 2010 341 REDACTED VERSION of 324 Letter, to Hon. Leonard P. Stark by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven)
April 15, 2010 340 REDACTED VERSION of 323 Exhibit to a Document to Letter to Hon. Leonard P. Stark by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-17 redacted in their entirety)(Caponi, Steven)
April 15, 2010 339 REDACTED VERSION of 322 Letter to Hon. Leonard P. Stark by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven)
April 15, 2010 338 REDACTED VERSION of 326 Letter TO THE HONORABLE LEONARD P. STARK DATED APRIL 8, 2010, by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-8, # 2 Exhibit 9, # 3 Exhibit 10-14)(Rovner, Philip) Modified on 4/19/2010 (nms).
April 14, 2010 337 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Expert Report of James Patrick Hughes on behalf of Defendant Facebook, Inc. by Facebook Inc..(Caponi, Steven)
April 14, 2010 336 REDACTED VERSION of 321 Letter To the Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Philip A. Rovner Dated April 7, 2010, by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1A-D, # 2 Exhibit 1E-K)(Rovner, Philip) Modified on 4/15/2010 (nms).
April 13, 2010 335 NOTICE Of Service of Disclosure of Expert Testimony of James Herbsleb, Ph.d. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2); Expert Damages Report of Russell L. Parr, Cfa, Asa; Disclosure of Expert Testimony for Giovanni Vigna, Ph.d. Pursuant to FED. R. CIV. P. 26(A)(2), by Leader Technologies Inc..(Rovner, Philip) Modified on 4/14/2010 (nms).
April 12, 2010 334 SEALED DECLARATION of Ryan Hopkins re 331 Answering Brief in Opposition to 304 Motion for Leave to Amend Responsive Pleading to Add a Defense and Counterclaim of Inequitable Conduct and to Amend its False Marking Counterclaim, (VOLUME 2 - EXHIBITS F-S), by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Rovner, Philip) Modified on 4/13/2010 (nms).
April 12, 2010 333 SEALED DECLARATION of Ryan Hopkins re 331 Answering Brief in Opposition re 304 Motion for Leave to Amend Responsive Pleading to Add a Defense and Counterclaim of Inequitable Conduct and to Amend its False Marking Counterclaim, (VOLUME 1 - EXHIBITS A-E) by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Rovner, Philip) Modified on 4/13/2010 (nms).
April 12, 2010 332 SEALED DECLARATION of Michael McKibben re 331 Answering Brief in Opposition to 304 Motion for Leave to Amend its Responsive Pleading to Add a Defense and Counterclaim of Inequitable Conduct and to Amend its False Marking Counterclaim, by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Rovner, Philip) Modified on 4/13/2010 (nms).
April 12, 2010 331 SEALED ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 304 MOTION to Amend Responsive Pleading to Add a Defense and Counterclaim of Inequitable Conduct and to Amend Its False Marking Counterclaim, filed by Leader Technologies Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 4/22/2010. (Rovner, Philip) Modified on 4/13/2010 (nms).
April 12, 2010 CORRECTING ENTRY: The PDF for the exhibit containing "Unreported Case" has been removed from D.I. 328. This filing was made under seal and publicly viewed documents should not be coupled therein. (nms)
April 9, 2010 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark - Telephone Conference held on 4/9/2010. (Court Reporter Heather Triozzi (Hawkins Reporting Service).) (rpg)
April 9, 2010 330 SEALED EXHIBIT A re 329 Declaration of Melissa H. Keyes, by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Caponi, Steven) (nms). Modified on 4/12/2010 (nms).
April 9, 2010 329 DECLARATION of Melissa H. Keyes re 328 Objections to Leader Technologies, Inc.'s Objections to the March 12, 2010 Order of Magistrate Judge Stark, by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven) Modified on 4/12/2010 (nms).
April 9, 2010 328 Sealed OBJECTIONS to 309 Objections, by Facebook Inc. . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit Unreported Case)(Caponi, Steven) (nms). Modified on 4/12/2010 (nms).
April 8, 2010 327 NOTICE OF SERVICE of LEADER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSES TO FACEBOOK, INC.'S SEVENTH SET OF INTERROGATORIES re 270 Notice of Service, by Leader Technologies Inc.. Related document: 270 Notice of Service, filed by Leader Technologies Inc..(Rovner, Philip)
April 8, 2010 326 SEALED Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Philip A. Rovner, Esq. Regarding Opposition Letter re Discovery Dispute per Court's Order of March 31, 2010 (D.I. 312). (Rovner, Philip) Modified on 4/9/2010 (nms).
April 8, 2010 325 SEALED EXHIBIT re 324 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Steven L. Caponi, Esq., counsel for Facebook, Inc. regarding Response in Preparation for Teleconference on April 9, 2010 by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven)
April 8, 2010 324 SEALED Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Steven L. Caponi, Esq., counsel for Facebook, Inc. regarding Response in Preparation for Teleconference on April 9, 2010 - re 321 Letter, 312 Order Setting Teleconference. (Caponi, Steven) (nms).
April 7, 2010 323 SEALED EXHIBIT re 322 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Steven L. Caponi, Esq., Counsel for Facebook, Inc. regarding Preparation for Teleconference on Friday, April 9, 2010 by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven) (nms).
April 7, 2010 322 SEALED Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Steven L. Caponi, Esq., Counsel for Facebook, Inc. regarding Preparation for Teleconference on Friday, April 9, 2010 - re 312 Order Setting Teleconference. (Caponi, Steven) (nms).
April 7, 2010 321 SEALED Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Philip A. Rovner, Esq. Regarding Discovery Dispute Letter per Court's Order of March 31, 2010 (D.I. 312). (Rovner, Philip) Modified on 4/8/2010 (nms).
April 6, 2010 319 Featured Case ORDER Granting 311 Joint STIPULATION To Extend Time for Expert Discovery Cut-Off, and the Deadline For Case Dispositive Motions to MAY 7, 2010 and MAY 14, 2010, filed by Leader Technologies Inc., (Set Deadlines: Expert Discovery due by 5/7/2010, Dispositive Motions due by 5/14/2010). Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 4/6/2010. (nms)
April 5, 2010 318 NOTICE Of Service of Plaintiff Leader Technologies, Inc.'S Supplemental Responses to Defendant Facebook, Inc.'S Interrogatory NOS. 1, 4, 5, 7, 10, 12-18, filed by Leader Technologies Inc..(Rovner, Philip) Modified on 4/6/2010 (nms).
April 5, 2010 317 REDACTED VERSION of 308 Exhibits 1-20 to Norberg Declaration, by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven) Modified on 4/6/2010 (nms).
April 5, 2010 316 REDACTED VERSION of 306 Exhibits A and B to Facebooks Opening Brief in Support in Its Motion for Leave to Amend it Responsive Pleading, by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Caponi, Steven) Modified on 4/6/2010 (nms).
April 5, 2010 315 REDACTED VERSION of 305 Opening Brief in Support, by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven)
April 1, 2010 320 Featured Case ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Thomas F. Smegal, Jr., Esq., is appointed as mediator for this matter. Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 4/1/2010. (nms)
April 1, 2010 314 REDACTED VERSION of 310 Declaration Of Yuridia Caire in Support of Plaintiff Leader Technologies, Inc.'S Objections to March 12, 2010 Order of Magistrate Judge Stark, by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Rovner, Philip) Modified on 4/5/2010 (nms).
April 1, 2010 313 REDACTED VERSION of 309 Objections To the March 12, 2010 Order of Magistrate Judge Stark, by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Rovner, Philip) Modified on 4/5/2010 (nms).
March 31, 2010 312 Order Setting Discovery Teleconference: Discovery Telephone Conference set for 4/9/2010 03:00 PM before Judge Leonard P. Stark. ( Please see Order for details regarding letter submissions ). Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/31/2010. (rpg)
March 30, 2010 311 Joint Stipulation to Extend Time Expert Discovery Cut-off; Deadline for Case Dispositive Motions to May 7, 2010; May 14, 2010 - filed by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Rovner, Philip) Modified on 3/31/2010 (nms).
March 26, 2010 310 SEALED DECLARATION OF YURIDIA CAIRE re 309 Sealed Objections To the March 12, 2010 Order of Magistrate Judge Stark, (Attachments Exhibits 1-4) by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Rovner, Philip) Modified on 3/29/2010 (nms).
March 26, 2010 309 SEALED OBJECTIONS re To the March 12, 2010 Order of Magistrate Judge Stark, by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Rovner, Philip) Modified on 3/29/2010 (nms).
March 25, 2010 308 SEALED EXHIBIT re 307 Declaration, by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven) (nms).
March 25, 2010 307 DECLARATION re 304 MOTION for Leave to Amend Its Responsive Pleading to Add a Defense and Counterclaim of Inequitable Conduct and to Amend Its False Marking Counterclaim, by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven) Modified on 3/26/2010 (nms).
March 25, 2010 306 SEALED EXHIBIT re 305 Opening Brief in Support, Defendant Facebook, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Amend Its Responsive Pleading to Add a Defense and Counterclaim of Inequitable Conduct and to Amend Its False Marking Counterclaim by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven) (nms).
March 25, 2010 305 SEALED OPENING BRIEF in Support re 304 MOTION for Leave to Amend Its Responsive Pleading to Add a Defense and Counterclaim of Inequitable Conduct and to Amend Its False Marking Counterclaim, filed by Facebook Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 4/12/2010. (Caponi, Steven) Modified on 3/26/2010 (nms). (nms).
March 25, 2010 304 MOTION for Leave to Amend Its Responsive Pleading to Add a Defense and Counterclaim of Inequitable Conduct and to Amend Its False Marking Counterclaim - filed by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Notice of Motion and Rule 7.1.1 Certification)(Caponi, Steven) Modified on 3/26/2010 (nms).
March 18, 2010 303 REDACTED VERSION of 287 Exhibits 1-9 to Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Steven L. Caponi, Esq., counsel for Facebook, Inc. regarding Discovery Dispute, by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven) Modified on 3/19/2010 (nms).
March 18, 2010 302 REDACTED VERSION of 286 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Steven L. Caponi, Esq., counsel for Facebook, Inc. regarding Discovery Dispute by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven)
March 18, 2010 301 REDACTED VERSION of 284 Exhibit 2 to Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark regarding Discovery Dispute, by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven) Modified on 3/19/2010 (nms).
March 18, 2010 300 REDACTED VERSION of 282 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Steven L. Caponi, Esq., counsel for Facebook, Inc. regarding Discovery Dispute by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven)
March 18, 2010 299 REDACTED VERSION of 275 Exhibits 1-4 and 6-29 to the Declaration of Jeffrey Norberg in Support of Defendant Facebook, Inc.'s Answering Brief in Response to Plaintiff Leader Technology, Inc.'s Assertion of Privilege, by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven) Modified on 3/19/2010 (nms).
March 18, 2010 298 REDACTED VERSION of 275 Exhibits 5 and 30 to the Declaration of Jeffrey Norberg in Support of Defendant Facebook, Inc.'s Answering Brief in Response to Plaintiff Leader Technology, Inc.'s Assertion of Privilege, by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven) Modified on 3/19/2010 (nms).
March 18, 2010 297 REDACTED VERSION of 274 Declaration of Jeffrey Norberg in Support of Defendant Facebook, Inc.'s Answering Brief in Response to Plaintiff Leader Technology, Inc.'s Assertion of Privilege by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven)
March 18, 2010 REDACTION NOTICE: In accordance with section G of the Administrative Procedures Governing Filing and Service by Electronic Means, redacted versions of sealed documents shall be filed electronically within 7 days of the filing of the sealed document. The records of this case do not reflect the filing of redacted versions of DI # 274 and 275 . (nms)
March 17, 2010 296 REDACTED VERSION of 288 Letter Dated March 10, 2010 to the Honorable Leonard P. Stark with Exhibits 1-9, by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Rovner, Philip) Modified on 3/18/2010 (nms).
March 17, 2010 295 REDACTED VERSION of 290 Declaration Of Kristopher Kastens in Support of Plaintiff Leader Technologies, Inc.'S Reply to Facebook's Opposition to Leader's Assertion of Privilege, with Exhibit 1, by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Rovner, Philip) Modified on 3/18/2010 (nms).
March 17, 2010 294 REDACTED VERSION of 289 Reply Brief To Facebook's Opposition to Leader's Assertion of Privilege, by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Rovner, Philip) Modified on 3/18/2010 (nms).
March 16, 2010 293 REDACTED VERSION of 273 Response to Order Defendant Facebook, Inc.'s Answering Brief in Response to Plaintiff Leader Technology, Inc.'s Assertion of Privilege by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven)
March 16, 2010 292 REDACTED VERSION of 285 Letter Dated March 9, 2010 from Philip A. Rovner, Esq. To the Honorable Leonard P. Stark, with Exhibits A-F, by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Rovner, Philip) Modified on 3/17/2010 (nms).
March 15, 2010 291 Letter to the Honorable Joseph J. Farnan, Jr., from Philip A. Rovner, Esq., regarding Selection Of Mediator - pursuant to 76 Scheduling Order. (Rovner, Philip) Modified on 3/16/2010 (nms).
March 12, 2010 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark - Oral Argument held on 3/12/2010. (Court Reporter: Heather Triozzi - Hawkins Rptg.) (ntl)
March 10, 2010 290 SEALED DECLARATION of Kristopher Kastens re 289 Reply Brief In Opposition to Leader's Assertion of Privilege, (Attachments: Exhibit 1) by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Rovner, Philip) Modified on 3/11/2010 (nms).
March 10, 2010 289 SEALED REPLY (submitted pursuant to 248 Order) In Opposition to Leader's Assertion of Privilege, filed by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Rovner, Philip) Modified on 3/11/2010 (nms).
March 10, 2010 288 SEALED Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Philip A. Rovner, Esq. Regarding Opposition Letter re Discovery Dispute per Court's Order of March 8, 2010 (re 271 Order, 282 Letter). (Rovner, Philip) Modified on 3/11/2010 (nms).
March 10, 2010 287 SEALED EXHIBIT re 286 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Steven L. Caponi, Esq., counsel for Facebook, Inc. regarding Discovery Dispute by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven) (nms).
March 10, 2010 286 SEALED Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Steven L. Caponi, Esq., counsel for Facebook, Inc. regarding Discovery Dispute - re 271 Order,. (Caponi, Steven) (nms).
March 9, 2010 285 SEALED Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Philip A. Rovner, Esq. Regarding Letter re Discovery Dispute per Court's Order of March 8, 2010 re 271 Order,. (Rovner, Philip) Modified on 3/10/2010 (nms).
March 9, 2010 284 SEALED EXHIBIT re 282 Letter Exhibit 2 to Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark regarding Discovery Dispute by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven) (nms).
March 9, 2010 283 EXHIBITS 1,3, and 4 re 282 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark regarding Discovery Dispute, by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven) Modified on 3/10/2010 (nms).
March 9, 2010 282 SEALED Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Steven L. Caponi, Esq., counsel for Facebook, Inc. regarding Discovery Dispute - re 271 Order,. (Caponi, Steven) (nms).
March 9, 2010 281 Featured Case ORDER assigning meanings to terms regarding United States Patent No. 7,139,761 (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 3/9/2010. (nms)
March 9, 2010 280 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION providing construction for the disputed terms. Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 3/9/2010. (nms)
March 8, 2010 279 REDACTED VERSION of 267 Declaration Of Kristopher Kastens in Support of Plaintiff Leader Technologies, Inc.'S Brief in Support of Determining Documents Privileged And/or Work Product under the Common Interest Doctrine, (Attachments: Exhibits 1-6), by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Rovner, Philip) Modified on 3/9/2010 (nms).
March 8, 2010 278 REDACTED VERSION of 266 Declaration Of Michael Mckibben in Support of Plaintiff Leader Technologies, Inc.'S Brief in Support of Determining Documents Privileged And/or Work Product under the Common Interest Doctrine, (Attachments: Exhibits 1-2, by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Rovner, Philip) Modified on 3/9/2010 (nms).
March 8, 2010 277 REDACTED VERSION of 265 Declaration Of Ryan Strong, by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Rovner, Philip) Modified on 3/9/2010 (nms).
March 8, 2010 276 REDACTED VERSION of 264 Opening Brief in Support Of Determining Documents Privileged And/or Work Product under the Common Interest Doctrine, by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Rovner, Philip) Modified on 3/9/2010 (nms).
March 8, 2010 275 SEALED EXHIBITS 1-30 re 274 Declaration of Jeffrey Norberg in Support of Answering Brief in Response to Plaintiff's Assertion of Privilege, by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven) (nms). Modified on 3/9/2010 (nms).
March 8, 2010 274 SEALED DECLARATION re 273 Response to Order Declaration of Jeffrey Norberg in Support of Answering Brief in Response to Plaintiff's Assertion of Privilege by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven) (nms).
March 8, 2010 273 SEALED RESPONSE to Order re 248 Order, Answering Brief in Response to Plaintiff's Assertion of Privilege filed by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven) (nms).
March 8, 2010 272 NOTICE OF SERVICE of PLAINTIFF LEADER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S SUPPLEMENTAL INITIAL DISCLOSURES TO DEFENDANT FACEBOOK, INC. re 21 Notice of Service by Leader Technologies Inc.. Related document: 21 Notice of Service filed by Leader Technologies Inc..(Rovner, Philip)
March 8, 2010 271 Featured Case ORDER Directing Parties to submit Discovery Letters by 3/9/2010 at 5:00 PM and 3/10/2010 at 5:00 PM for consideration of new discovery matter at Oral Argument on 3/12/2010 at 3:30 PM in Courtroom 6C before the Honorable Leonard P. Stark. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/8/2010. (rpg)
March 5, 2010 270 NOTICE OF SERVICE of LEADER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S RESPONSES TO FACEBOOK, INC.'S SEVENTH SET OF INTERROGATORIES (RE: MARKING); LEADER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S RESPONSES TO FACEBOOK, INC.'S FIFTH SET OF REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO LEADER TECHNOLOGIES, INC. (RE: MARKING) by Leader Technologies Inc..(Rovner, Philip)
March 5, 2010 269 Official Transcript of Markman Hearing held on 01-20-10 before Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. Court Reporter/Transcriber Heather Triozzi. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/26/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/5/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/3/2010. (lad)
March 3, 2010 Remark: The docket text for D.I. 264 has been amended by removing the Answering Brief due date that was set, and a link to the Order setting the briefing scheduled D.I. 248 was created. (nms)
March 3, 2010 CORRECTING ENTRY: Discovery Order at D.I. 248 was unsealed and the associated docket entry was amended. (ntl)
March 2, 2010 268 REDACTED VERSION of 244 Exhibits 1 - 3 to Facebook, Inc.'s Letter to the Honorable Leonard P. Stark (D.I. 243), by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven) Modified on 3/3/2010 (nms).
March 1, 2010 267 SEALED DECLARATION of Kristopher Kastens re 264 Opening Brief (Attachments: Exhibits 1-6), by Leader Technologies Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Rovner, Philip) Modified on 3/2/2010 (nms).
March 1, 2010 266 SEALED DECLARATION of Michael McKibben re 264 Opening Brief, (Attachments: Exhibits 1-2) by Leader Technologies Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Rovner, Philip) Modified on 3/2/2010 (nms).
March 1, 2010 265 SEALED DECLARATION of Ryan Strong re 264 Opening Brief in Support, by Leader Technologies Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Rovner, Philip) Modified on 3/2/2010 (nms).
March 1, 2010 264 SEALED OPENING BRIEF (submitted pursuant to 248 Order) in Support Of Determining Documents Privileged And/or Work Product under the Common Interest Doctrine, filed by Leader Technologies Inc.(a Delaware corporation).. (Rovner, Philip) Modified on 3/2/2010 (nms). Modified on 3/3/2010 (nms).
March 1, 2010 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 263 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney SEAN BOYLE, ESQ. filed by Leader Technologies Inc.. Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 3/1/2010. (nms)
March 1, 2010 REDACTION NOTICE: In accordance with section G of the Administrative Procedures Governing Filing and Service by Electronic Means, redacted versions of sealed documents shall be filed electronically within 7 days of the filing of the sealed document. The records of this case do not reflect the filing of a redacted version of DI # 244 . (nms)
February 26, 2010 263 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney SEAN BOYLE, ESQ. - filed by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Rovner, Philip)
February 26, 2010 262 Letter to THE HONORABLE LEONARD P. STARK from PHILIP A. ROVNER, ESQ. regarding PUBLIC VERSION OF COURT'S FEBRUARY 22, 2010 ORDER - re 248 Order. (Rovner, Philip)
February 25, 2010 261 REDACTED VERSION of 245 Letter Dated February 18, 2010 from Philip A. Rovner, Esq. To the Honorable Leonard P. Stark, by Leader Technologies Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Rovner, Philip) Modified on 2/26/2010 (nms).
February 24, 2010 260 Official Transcript of Teleconference held on 02-16-10 before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter/Transcriber Deanna Warner. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/17/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/29/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/25/2010. (lad)
February 24, 2010 259 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Deborah Weckerly on March 9, 2010 by Facebook Inc..(Caponi, Steven)
February 24, 2010 258 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Design Central Inc. on March 9, 2010 by Facebook Inc..(Caponi, Steven)
February 24, 2010 257 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Steven Nester on March 10, 2010 by Facebook Inc..(Caponi, Steven)
February 24, 2010 256 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Facebook, Inc.'s Supplemental Initial Disclosures by Facebook Inc..(Caponi, Steven)
February 24, 2010 255 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Edward B. Detwiler on March 11, 2010 by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Caponi, Steven)
February 24, 2010 254 REDACTED VERSION of 234 Exhibit to a Document Exhibits 1 and 2 re 233 Letter Regarding Discovery Dispute, in Accordance with Order of February 3, 2010 by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven)
February 24, 2010 253 REDACTED VERSION of 233 Letter, to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Steven L. Caponi, Esq., counsel to Facebook, Inc. regarding Discovery Dispute, in Accordance with Order of February 3, 2010 by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven)
February 24, 2010 252 REDACTED VERSION of 232 Exhibit to a Document Exhibits 1 - 13 to re 231 Letter Regarding Discovery Dispute, in Accordance with Order of February 3, 2010 by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven)
February 24, 2010 251 REDACTED VERSION of 231 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Steven L. Caponi, Esq., counsel for Facebook, Inc. regarding Discovery Dispute, in Accordance with Order of February 3, 2010 by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven)
February 24, 2010 REDACTION NOTICE: In accordance with section G of the Administrative Procedures Governing Filing and Service by Electronic Means, redacted versions of sealed documents shall be filed electronically within 7 days of the filing of the sealed document. The records of this case do not reflect the filing of redacted versions of DI # 231 , 232 . 233 , and 234 . (nms)
February 23, 2010 250 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Keith Voigts on February 25, 2010 by Facebook Inc..(Caponi, Steven)
February 22, 2010 249 NOTICE to Take Deposition of DAN ROSE on MARCH 1, 2010 by Leader Technologies Inc..(Rovner, Philip)
February 22, 2010 248 Featured Case ORDER re discovery; briefing on the assertion of privilege shall take place on 3/1/10 (opening), 3/8/10 (answering) and 3/10/10 (reply); oral argument will be held on 3/12/10 at 3:30 pm in courtroom 6C. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 2/22/10. (ntl) (ntl). Modified on 3/3/2010 (ntl).
February 19, 2010 247 REDACTED VERSION of 235 Letter To the Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Philip A. Rovner, Esq. (Attachments: Exhibits 1-5), by Leader Technologies Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Rovner, Philip) Modified on 2/22/2010 (nms).
February 18, 2010 246 REDACTED VERSION of 230 Letter PUBLIC VERSION OF LETTER DATED FEBRUARY 11, 2010 TO THE HONORABLE LEONARD P. STARK, WITH EXHIBITS A-E by Leader Technologies Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Rovner, Philip)
February 18, 2010 245 SEALED Letter to THE HONORABLE LEONARD P. STARK from PHILIP A. ROVNER, ESQ. regarding MATERIALS FOR IN CAMERA REVIEW PER FEBRUARY 16, 2010 HEARING - re Telephone Conference. (Rovner, Philip)
February 18, 2010 244 SEALED EXHIBIT re 243 Letter by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven) (nms).
February 18, 2010 243 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Steven L. Caponi, Esq., Counsel to Facebook, Inc. regarding Discovery Dispute - re Telephone Conference. (Caponi, Steven)
February 18, 2010 242 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Steven Nester on March 1, 2010 by Facebook Inc..(Caponi, Steven)
February 18, 2010 241 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Deborah Weckerly on February 26, 2010 by Facebook Inc..(Caponi, Steven)
February 16, 2010 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark - Telephone Conference held on 2/16/2010. (Court Reporter: Deanna Warner - Hawkins Rptg.) (ntl)
February 16, 2010 240 NOTICE to Take Deposition of NW Patent Funding Corp. on February 19, 2010 by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Subpoena to Testify directed to NW Patend Funding Corp.)(Caponi, Steven)
February 16, 2010 239 NOTICE to Take Deposition of ANDREW BOSWORTH on FEBRUARY 26, 2010 by Leader Technologies Inc..(Rovner, Philip)
February 12, 2010 238 NOTICE to Take Deposition of James Sobwick on February 16, 2010 by Facebook Inc..(Caponi, Steven)
February 12, 2010 237 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Jeffrey R. Lamb on February 19, 2010 by Facebook Inc..(Caponi, Steven)
February 12, 2010 236 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Timothy W. Fathbruckner on February 17, 2010 by Facebook Inc..(Caponi, Steven)
February 12, 2010 235 SEALED Letter to THE HONORABLE LEONARD P. STARK from PHILIP A. ROVNER, ESQ. regarding RESPONSE LETTER REGARDING DISCOVERY DISPUTE FOR 2/16/10 TELECONFERENCE - re 227 Order Setting Teleconference, 234 Exhibit to a Document, 233 Letter. (Rovner, Philip)
February 12, 2010 234 SEALED EXHIBIT re 233 Letter Regarding Discovery Dispute, in Accordance with Order of February 3, 2010 by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven) (nms).
February 12, 2010 233 SEALED Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Steven L. Caponi, Esq., counsel to Facebook, Inc. regarding Discovery Dispute, in Accordance with Order of February 3, 2010 - re 230 Letter, 227 Order Setting Teleconference. (Caponi, Steven) (nms).
February 12, 2010 232 SEALED EXHIBIT re 231 Letter Regarding Discovery Dispute, in Accordance with Order of February 3, 2010 by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven) (nms).
February 12, 2010 231 SEALED Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Steven L. Caponi, Esq., counsel for Facebook, Inc. regarding Discovery Dispute, in Accordance with Order of February 3, 2010 - re 227 Order Setting Teleconference. (Caponi, Steven) (nms).
February 11, 2010 230 SEALED Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Philip A. Rovner, Esq. Regarding Letter re Discovery Dispute in Accordance with Order of February 3, 2010 - re 227 Order Setting Teleconference. (Rovner, Philip) Modified on 2/12/2010 (nms).
February 9, 2010 229 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Ladenburg Thalman & Co. pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) on February 20, 2010 by Facebook Inc..(Caponi, Steven)
February 9, 2010 228 NOTICE to Take Deposition of RUCHI SANGHVI on FEBRUARY 26, 2010 by Leader Technologies Inc.(a Delaware corporation).(Rovner, Philip)
February 3, 2010 227 Order Setting Teleconference: Discovery Telephone Conference set for 2/16/2010 12:00 PM before Judge Leonard P. Stark. ( Please see Order for details regarding letter submission(s) ). Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 2/3/2010. (rpg)
February 2, 2010 226 AMENDED NOTICE to Take Deposition of IP Investments Group LLC on 02/05/2010 by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Caponi, Steven) Modified on 2/3/2010 (nms).
February 2, 2010 225 AMENDED NOTICE to Take Deposition of Ackrell Capital LLC on 02/03/2010 by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Caponi, Steven) Modified on 2/3/2010 (nms).
January 29, 2010 224 Letter to THE HONORABLE JOSEPH J. FARNAN, JR from PHILIP A. ROVNER, ESQ. regarding RESPONSE TO FACEBOOK'S IDENTIFICATION OF CLAIM TERMS - re Markman Hearing, 219 Letter,. (Rovner, Philip)
January 28, 2010 223 NOTICE to Take Deposition of STEPHEN D. HAGGERTY on FEBRUARY 28, 2010 by Leader Technologies Inc.(a Delaware corporation).(Rovner, Philip)
January 25, 2010 222 NOTICE to Take Deposition of JAMES WANG on FEBRUARY 17, 2010 by Leader Technologies Inc.(a Delaware corporation).(Rovner, Philip)
January 25, 2010 221 NOTICE to Take Deposition of DANIEL CHAI on FEBRUARY 19, 2010 by Leader Technologies Inc.(a Delaware corporation).(Rovner, Philip)
January 25, 2010 220 NOTICE to Take Deposition of CIPORA HERMAN on FEBRUARY 18, 2010 by Leader Technologies Inc.(a Delaware corporation).(Rovner, Philip)
January 22, 2010 219 Letter to The Honorable Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. from Steven L. Caponi, counsel for Defendant Facebook, Inc. regarding claim terms which need construction, per Court Order of January 20, 2010 - re Markman Hearing, 191 Claim Construction Answering Brief. (Caponi, Steven)
January 20, 2010 CORRECTING ENTRY: The pdf for Exhibit A in D.I. 193 has been replaced with an amended version. The document was amended to include a page that was inadvertently left out. (nms)
January 20, 2010 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. - Markman Hearing held on 1/20/2010. The parties presented presentation with respect to the terms and/or phrases in dispute relating to the patent. Defendant will submit by 1/22/2010, via a letter, a narrowed list of terms which need construction. Plaintiff shall respond to that letter within a week of receiving it. (Court Reporter Heather Triozzi (Hawkins Reporting Service).) (nms)
January 19, 2010 218 Featured Case ORDER Granting the request for the use of electronic equipment at the hearing set for 1/20/2010 (see 213 Letter). Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 1/19/2010. (nms)
January 19, 2010 217 NOTICE to Take Deposition of CHRISTOPHER COX on FEBRUARY 11, 2010 by Leader Technologies Inc.(a Delaware corporation).(Rovner, Philip)
January 19, 2010 216 NOTICE to Take Deposition of DUSTIN MOSKOVITZ on FEBRUARY 12, 2010 by Leader Technologies Inc.(a Delaware corporation).(Rovner, Philip)
January 19, 2010 215 NOTICE to Take Deposition of JOSH WISEMAN on FEBRUARY 15, 2010 by Leader Technologies Inc.(a Delaware corporation).(Rovner, Philip)
January 19, 2010 214 NOTICE to Take Deposition of MARK ZUCKERBERG on FEBRUARY 10, 2010 by Leader Technologies Inc.(a Delaware corporation).(Rovner, Philip)
January 15, 2010 213 Letter to Ms. Deborah Krett, Case Manager, from Philip A. Rovner, Esq., Regarding Electronic Equipment for Markman Hearing. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Rovner, Philip) Modified on 1/19/2010 (nms).
January 15, 2010 212 Letter to The Hon. Leonard P. Stark, from Steven L. Caponi, counsel for Defendant Facebook, Inc., regarding Facebook's proposed (unopposed) request for additional discovery. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Caponi, Steven) Modified on 1/19/2010 (nms).
January 14, 2010 211 NOTICE to Take Deposition of KAREL BALOUN (NOTICE AND SUBPOENA) on JANUARY 27, 2010 by Leader Technologies Inc.(a Delaware corporation).(Rovner, Philip)
January 14, 2010 210 NOTICE to Take Deposition of THYAGARAJA S. RAMAKRISHNAN (NOTICE AND SUBPOENA) on JANUARY 26, 2010 by Leader Technologies Inc.(a Delaware corporation).(Rovner, Philip)
January 14, 2010 209 NOTICE to Take Deposition of ADAM D'ANGELO (NOTICE AND SUBPOENA) on JANUARY 25, 2010 by Leader Technologies Inc.(a Delaware corporation).(Rovner, Philip)
January 13, 2010 208 NOTICE to Take Deposition of David Desser on January 14, 2010 (Amended) by Facebook Inc..(Caponi, Steven)
January 13, 2010 207 Official Transcript of Teleconference held on 12-23-09 before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter/Transcriber Heather Triozzi. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/3/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/16/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/13/2010. (lad)
January 11, 2010 206 NOTICE to Take Deposition of 30(b)(6) NOTICE TO FACEBOOK, INC. on JANUARY 25, 2010 by Leader Technologies Inc.(a Delaware corporation).(Rovner, Philip)
January 6, 2010 205 ANSWER to 190 Second Amended Answer, and Counterclaims, by Leader Technologies Inc.(a Delaware corporation).(Rovner, Philip) Modified on 1/7/2010 (nms).
January 6, 2010 204 REDACTED VERSION of 185 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark dated December 22, 2009 by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven)
January 6, 2010 203 REDACTED VERSION of 184 Exhibit to a Document Exhibits 1 - 9 and 11 - 20 to Letter to The Honorable P. Stark dated December 21, 2009 by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven)
January 6, 2010 202 REDACTED VERSION of 184 Exhibit to a Document Exhibit 10 to Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark dated December 21, 2009 by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven)
January 6, 2010 201 REDACTED VERSION of 183 Letter to the Honorable Leonard P. Stark dated December 21, 2009 by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven)
January 5, 2010 REDACTION NOTICE: In accordance with section G of the Administrative Procedures Governing Filing and Service by Electronic Means, redacted versions of sealed documents shall be filed electronically within 7 days of the filing of the sealed document. The records of this case do not reflect the filing of redacted versions of DI # 183 and 184 . (nms)
January 5, 2010 REDACTION NOTICE: In accordance with section G of the Administrative Procedures Governing Filing and Service by Electronic Means, redacted versions of sealed documents shall be filed electronically within 7 days of the filing of the sealed document. The records of this case do not reflect the filing of a redacted version of DI # 185 . (nms)
December 31, 2009 200 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Neyer Holdings Corp. on January 6, 2010 at 9:00 a.m. by Facebook Inc..(Caponi, Steven)
December 31, 2009 199 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoena Directed to David Desser to Testify at a Deposition in a Civil Action by Facebook Inc..(Caponi, Steven)
December 30, 2009 198 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Deposition and Subpoena Directed to Dustin Moskovitz by Leader Technologies Inc.(a Delaware corporation).(Rovner, Philip) Modified on 1/4/2010 (nms).
December 30, 2009 197 DECLARATION OF JAMES HANNAH re 196 Reply Brief TO 191 Answering Claim Construction Brief, and in further support of 179 Opening Claim Construction Brief, with exhibits 1-4, by Leader Technologies Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Rovner, Philip) Modified on 1/4/2010 (nms).
December 30, 2009 196 REPLY BRIEF TO 191 Answering CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF, and in further support of 179 Opening Claim Construction Brief, filed by Leader Technologies Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Rovner, Philip) Modified on 1/4/2010 (nms).
December 29, 2009 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 188 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Elizabeth L. Stameshkin filed by Facebook Inc.. Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 12/29/2009. (nms)
December 29, 2009 195 REDACTED VERSION of 187 Letter Dated December 22, 2009 from Philip A. Rovner to the Honorable Leonard P. Stark, by Leader Technologies Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Rovner, Philip) Modified on 12/30/2009 (nms).
December 29, 2009 194 REDACTED VERSION of 182 Letter Dated December 21, 2009 from Philip A. Rovner to the Honorable Leonard P. Stark, by Leader Technologies Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Rovner, Philip) Modified on 12/30/2009 (nms).
December 23, 2009 193 DECLARATION of Mark Weinstein re 191 Claim Construction Answering Brief, by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Caponi, Steven) Modified on 12/29/2009 (nms). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/20/2010: # 1 Exhibit A) (nms).
December 23, 2009 192 DECLARATION of Dr. Saul Greenberg, PH.D. re 191 Claim Construction Answering Brief, by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Caponi, Steven) Modified on 12/29/2009 (nms).
December 23, 2009 191 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ANSWERING BRIEF filed by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven)
December 23, 2009 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark - Telephone Conference held on 12/23/2009. (Court Reporter: Heather Triozzi - Hawkins Rptg.) (ntl)
December 23, 2009 190 SECOND AMENDED ANSWER to 5 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, 12 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, 1 Complaint, by Facebook Inc. (rpg)
December 23, 2009 189 Featured Case ORDER granting 127 Motion for Leave to File Amended Responsive Pleading and denying 130 Motion to Stay Pending Reexamination of Patents. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/23/2009. (rpg)
December 23, 2009 CORRECTING ENTRY: The PDF for D.I. 186 has been replaced with an amended version. The new version adds a cover page to the filing. (nms)
December 23, 2009 188 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Elizabeth L. Stameshkin - filed by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order for pro hac motion of Elizabeth L. Stameshkin on behalf of Defendant Facebook, Inc., # 2 Exhibit Certification of Elizabeth L. Stameshkin)(Caponi, Steven)
December 22, 2009 187 SEALED Letter to THE HONORABLE LEONARD P. STARK from PHILIP A. ROVNER, ESQ. regarding DISCOERY DISPUTE RE 12/23/09 TELECONFERENCE - re 183 Letter. (Rovner, Philip)
December 22, 2009 186 EXHIBIT re 185 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Steven L. Caponi, counsel to Facebook, Inc. regarding Discovery Issues by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven) (nms).
December 22, 2009 185 SEALED Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Steven L. Caponi, counsel to Facebook, Inc. regarding Discovery Issues - re 182 Letter. (Caponi, Steven) (nms).
December 21, 2009 184 SEALED EXHIBIT re 183 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Steven L. Caponi, counsel for Defendant Facebook, Inc. regarding Discovery Issues by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven) (nms).
December 21, 2009 183 SEALED Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Steven L. Caponi, counsel for Defendant Facebook, Inc. regarding Discovery Issues. (Caponi, Steven) (nms).
December 21, 2009 182 SEALED Letter to THE HONORABLE LEONARD P. STARK from PHILIP A. ROVNER, ESQ. regarding (FILED UNDER SEAL) RE DISCOVERY DISPUTE FOR 12/23 TELECONFERENCE - re 178 Order Setting Teleconference. (Rovner, Philip)
December 10, 2009 181 DECLARATION OF GIOVANNI VIGNA re 179 Claim Construction Opening Brief by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Rovner, Philip) Modified on 12/11/2009 (nms).
December 10, 2009 180 DECLARATION Of Paul J. Andre re 179 Claim Construction Opening Brief by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, PART 1, # 5 Exhibit 4 PART2, # 6 Exhibit 4 PART 3, # 7 Exhibit 4 PART 4, # 8 Exhibit 4 PART 5, # 9 Exhibit 4 PART 6, # 10 Exhibit 4 PART 7, # 11 Exhibit 4 PART 8, # 12 Exhibit 5)(Rovner, Philip) Modified on 12/11/2009 (nms).
December 10, 2009 179 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION OPENING BRIEF filed by Leader Technologies Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Rovner, Philip)
December 10, 2009 178 Order Setting Teleconference: Telephone Conference set for 12/23/2009 11:00 AM before Judge Leonard P. Stark re discovery dispute. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/10/09. (ntl)
December 4, 2009 177 Letter to The Honorable Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. from Steven L. Caponi, counsel for Defendant Facebook, Inc. regarding Order of December 3, 2009 requiring parties to submit proposals regarding representative claims - re Oral Order, 176 Letter. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Email string between the parties re claims)(Caponi, Steven)
December 4, 2009 176 Letter to THE HONORABLE JOSEPH J. FARNAN, JR. from PHILIP A. ROVNER, ESQ. regarding PROPOSAL REGARDING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION PER ORAL ORDER OF DECEMBER 3, 2009 - re Oral Order. (Rovner, Philip)
December 3, 2009 Featured Case ORAL ORDER: Parties shall either agree to a set of representative claims or submit a proposal to the Court by December 4, 2009 at 12:00 noon. ORDERED by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 12/4/2009. (dlk)
December 1, 2009 175 REDACTED VERSIONS of 156 Declaration and 157 Exhibit to a Document by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits C-I and O-Q)(Caponi, Steven) Modified on 12/3/2009 (nms).
December 1, 2009 174 Letter to Honorable Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. from Steven L. Caponi, counsel for Defendant Facebook, Inc. regarding request for status conference regarding case management issues re claim construction process. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Pages 18-19 of 3-3-09 hearing transcript)(Caponi, Steven)
November 30, 2009 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark - Telephone Conference held on 11/30/2009. (Court Reporter: Heather Triozzi - Hawkins Rptg.) (ntl)
November 24, 2009 173 REDACTED VERSION of Redaction Notice, 155 Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Stay Pending Reexamination of U.S. Patent No. 7,139,761 by Facebook Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Caponi, Steven)
November 24, 2009 172 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Responses to Plaintiff's Fifth Set of Interrogatories, Responses to Plaintiff's Third Set of Requests for Admission and Facebook, Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's Fourth Set of Requests for Production of Documents (Nos. 79-177) by Facebook Inc..(Caponi, Steven)
November 23, 2009 171 Order Setting Teleconference: Telephone Conference set for 11/30/2009 12:30 PM before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 11/23/2009. (rpg)
November 23, 2009 REDACTION NOTICE: In accordance with section G of the Administrative Procedures Governing Filing and Service by Electronic Means, redacted versions of sealed documents shall be filed electronically within 5 business days of the filing of the sealed document. The records of this case do not reflect the filing of redacted versions of DI # 155 and 157 . (nms)
November 20, 2009 170 NOTICE OF SERVICE of LEADER TECHNOLOGIES INC.'S RESPONSES TO FACEBOOK, INC.'S SIXTH SET OF INTERROGATORIES (NOS. 22-35); LEADER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S RESPONSES TO FACEBOOK, INC.'S SECOND SET OF REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS TO LEADER TECHNOLOGIES, INC. (NOS. 21-25); LEADER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S RESPONSES TO FACEBOOK, INC.'S FOURTH SET OF REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO LEADER TECHNOLOGIES, INC. (NOS. 86-91); LEADER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S THIRD SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE TO FACEBOOK, INC.'S INTERROGATORY NO. 1, FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE TO FACEBOOK, INC.'S INTERROGATORY NO. 8, AND SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSES TO FACEBOOK, INC.'S INTERROGATORIES NOS. 10 AND 12-17 re 116 Notice of Service, 136 Notice of Service, 17 Notice (Other) by Leader Technologies Inc.(a Delaware corporation). Related document: 116 Notice of Service filed by Facebook Inc., 136 Notice of Service, filed by Facebook Inc., 17 Notice (Other) filed by Facebook Inc..(Rovner, Philip)
November 20, 2009 169 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Steven L. Caponi regarding request for a status conference. (Caponi, Steven)
November 19, 2009 168 REDACTED VERSION of 145 Letter, to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Steven L. Caponi, Counsel for Defendant Facebook, Inc. regarding Discovery Dispute by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven)
November 18, 2009 167 REDACTED VERSION of 151 Letter DATED NOVEMBER 10, 2009 FROM PHILP A. ROVNER, ESQ. TO THE HONORABLE LEONARD P. STARK by Leader Technologies Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit G-K)(Rovner, Philip) Modified on 11/19/2009 (nms).
November 17, 2009 166 REDACTED VERSION of 149 Declaration OF JAMES HANNAH IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF LEADER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S ANSWERING BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT FACEBOOK INC.'S MOTION TO STAY PENDING REEXAMINATION OF U.S. PATENT NO. 7,139,761 WITH EXHIBITS A-Q by Leader Technologies Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit N-Q)(Rovner, Philip) Modified on 11/18/2009 (nms).
November 17, 2009 165 REDACTED VERSION of 150 Declaration OF MICHAEL T. MCKIBBEN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF LEADER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S ANSWERING BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT FACEBOOK INC.'S MOTION TO STAY PENDING REEXAMINATION OF U.S. PATENT NO. 7,139,761 by Leader Technologies Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Rovner, Philip) Modified on 11/18/2009 (nms).
November 17, 2009 164 REDACTED VERSION of 148 Answering Brief IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT FACEBOOK, INC.'S MOTION TO STAY PENDING REEXAMINATION OF U.S. PATENT NO. 7,139,761 by Leader Technologies Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Rovner, Philip) Modified on 11/18/2009 (nms).
November 17, 2009 163 REDACTED VERSION of 147 Declaration OF JAMES HANNAH IN SUPPORT OF ANSWERING BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO FACEBOOK INC.'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ITS RESPONSIVE PLEADING TO ADD A COUNTERCLAIM OF FALSE MARKING WITH EXHIBITS A-F by Leader Technologies Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-F)(Rovner, Philip) Modified on 11/18/2009 (nms).
November 17, 2009 162 REDACTED VERSION of 146 Answering Brief in Opposition to MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ITS RESPONSIVE PLEADING TO ADD A COUNTERCLAIM OF FALSE MARKING by Leader Technologies Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Rovner, Philip) Modified on 11/18/2009 (nms).
November 17, 2009 161 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Response to Leader Technologies, Inc.'s Third Set of Requests for Production of Documents (75-78) and Responses to Plaintiff Leader Technologies, Inc.'s Fourth Set of Interrogatories by Facebook Inc..(Caponi, Steven)
November 17, 2009 Featured Case ORAL ORDER: The November 19, 2009 Motion Day Hearing regarding D.I. 130 MOTION to Stay Pending Reexamination of U.S. Patent No. 7,139,761 filed by Facebook Inc., and D.I. 127 MOTION for Leave to File -- Motion for Leave to Amend its Responsive Pleading to Add a Counterclaim of False Marking filed by Facebook Inc. is CANCELED. The motions have been referred to Magistrate Judge Stark.. Ordered by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 11/17/2009. (dlk)
November 16, 2009 160 NOTICE OF SERVICE of LEADER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S RESPONSES TO FACEBOOK, INC.'S FIFTH SET OF INTERROGATORIES (NOS. 19-21); LEADER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S RESPONSES TO FACEBOOK, INC.'S THIRD SET OF REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO LEADER TECHNOLOGIES, INC. (NOS. 81-85) re 135 Notice of Service by Leader Technologies Inc.(a Delaware corporation). Related document: 135 Notice of Service filed by Facebook Inc..(Rovner, Philip)
November 13, 2009 159 STENO NOTES of teleconference held on 11/13/09 before Judge Stark. Court Reporter: B. Gaffigan. (Notes on file in Clerk's Office) (ntl)
November 13, 2009 158 Official Transcript of Telephone Conference held on Friday, November 13, 2009 before Magistrate Judge Stark. Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/4/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/14/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/11/2010. (bpg)
November 13, 2009 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark - Telephone Conference held on 11/13/2009. (Court Reporter B. Gaffigan.) (ntl)
November 13, 2009 157 SEALED EXHIBITS C-I and O-Q re 156 Declaration of Jeffrey Norberg by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven) Modified on 11/16/2009 (nms).
November 13, 2009 156 DECLARATION of Jeffrey Norberg re 155 Reply Brief re Motion to Stay Pending Reexamination of U.S. Patent No. 7,139,761 by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit J, # 4 Exhibit K, # 5 Exhibit L, # 6 Exhibit M, # 7 Exhibit N)(Caponi, Steven) Modified on 11/16/2009 (nms).
November 13, 2009 155 SEALED REPLY BRIEF re 130 MOTION to Stay Pending Reexamination of U.S. Patent No. 7,139,761 filed by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven) (nms).
November 13, 2009 154 REPLY BRIEF re 127 Motion for Leave to Amend its Responsive Pleading to Add a Counterclaim of False Marking filed by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven) Modified on 11/16/2009 (nms).
November 13, 2009 153 Letter to THE HONORABLE LEONARD P. STARK from PAUL J. ANDRE, ESQ. regarding RESPONSE TO NOVEMBER 12, 2009 LETTER FROM FACEBOOK'S COUNSEL - re 152 Letter. (Rovner, Philip)
November 12, 2009 152 Letter to Magistrate Judge Stark from co-counsel for Facebook, Inc., Heidi Keefe (admitted pro hac vice) regarding potential spoliation of evidence. (Caponi, Steven)
November 10, 2009 151 SEALED Letter to THE HONORABLE LEONARD P. STARK from PHILIP A. ROVNER, ESQ. regarding LETTER IN OPPOSITION TO FACEBOOK LETTER OF NOVEMBER 9, 2009 PER ORDER OF NOVEMBER 6, 2009 - re 145 Letter, 144 Order Setting Teleconference. (Rovner, Philip)
November 9, 2009 150 SEALED DECLARATION OF MICHAEL T. MCKIBBEN re 148 Answering Brief in Opposition TO DEFENDANT FACEBOOK INC.'S MOTION TO STAY PENDING REEXAMINATION OF U.S. PATENT NO. 7,139,761 by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Rovner, Philip) Modified on 11/10/2009 (nms).
November 9, 2009 149 SEALED DECLARATION OF JAMES HANNAH re 148 Answering Brief in Opposition TO DEFENDANT FACEBOOK INC.'S MOTION TO STAY PENDING REEXAMINATION OF U.S. PATENT NO. 7,139,761 WITH EXHIBITS A-Qby Leader Technologies Inc.. (Rovner, Philip) Modified on 11/10/2009 (nms).
November 9, 2009 148 SEALED ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 130 MOTION to Stay Pending Reexamination of U.S. Patent No. 7,139,761, filed by Leader Technologies Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 11/20/2009. (Rovner, Philip) Modified on 11/10/2009 (nms).
November 9, 2009 147 SEALED DECLARATION OF JAMES HANNAH re 146 Answering Brief in Opposition TO DEFENDANT FACEBOOK INC.'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ITS RESPONSIVE PLEADING TO ADD A COUNTERCLAIM OF FALSE MARKING WITH EXHIBITS A-F by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Rovner, Philip) Modified on 11/10/2009 (nms).
November 9, 2009 146 SEALED ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 127 Motion for Leave to Amend its Responsive Pleading to Add a Counterclaim of False Marking filed by Leader Technologies Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 11/20/2009. (Rovner, Philip) Modified on 11/10/2009 (nms).
November 9, 2009 145 SEALED Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Steven L. Caponi, Counsel for Defendant Facebook, Inc. regarding Discovery Dispute - re 144 Order Setting Teleconference, 130 MOTION to Stay Pending Reexamination of U.S. Patent No. 7,139,761. (Caponi, Steven) (nms).
November 6, 2009 144 Order Setting Teleconference: Discovery Telephone Conference set for 11/13/2009 09:30 AM before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 11/6/2009. (rpg)
November 3, 2009 143 REDACTED VERSION of 134 Letter, The Hon. Leonard P. Stark regarding Response to October 21, 2009 letter from Plaintiff Leader Technologies, Inc by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits)(Caponi, Steven)
November 3, 2009 142 REDACTED VERSION of 124 Letter, to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark regarding Discovery dispute regarding Defendant's Interrogatory Nos. 4 and 11 by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits)(Caponi, Steven)
November 2, 2009 REDACTION NOTICE: In accordance with section G of the Administrative Procedures Governing Filing and Service by Electronic Means, redacted versions of sealed documents shall be filed electronically within 5 business days of the filing of the sealed document. The records of this case do not reflect the filing of a redacted version of DI # 124 . (nms)
November 2, 2009 REDACTION NOTICE: In accordance with section G of the Administrative Procedures Governing Filing and Service by Electronic Means, redacted versions of sealed documents shall be filed electronically within 5 business days of the filing of the sealed document. The records of this case do not reflect the filing of a redacted version of DI # 134 . (nms)
October 29, 2009 141 REDACTED VERSION of 133 Letter DATED OCTOBER 22, 2009 TO THE HONORABLE LEONARD P. STARK by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Rovner, Philip) Modified on 10/30/2009 (nms).
October 28, 2009 140 NOTICE OF SERVICE of LEADER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE TO FACEBOOK, INC.'S INTERROGATORY NO. 1, FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSES TO FACEBOOK'S INTERROGATORY N OS. 4, 11-17 AND THIRD SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE TO FACEBOOK'S INTERROGATORY NO. 9 re 24 Notice of Service, 112 Notice of Service,, 121 Notice of Service, by Leader Technologies Inc.. Related document: 24 Notice of Service, filed by Leader Technologies Inc., 112 Notice of Service,, filed by Leader Technologies Inc., 121 Notice of Service, filed by Leader Technologies Inc..(Rovner, Philip)
October 28, 2009 139 REDACTED VERSION of 125 Letter DATED OCTOBER 21, 2009 TO THE HONORABLE LEONARD P. STARK WITH EXHIBITS 1-10 by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Rovner, Philip) Modified on 10/29/2009 (nms).
October 27, 2009 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 138 Stipulation Regarding Amendment To Stipulated Protective Order filed by Leader Technologies Inc.. Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 10/27/2009. (nms)
October 26, 2009 138 Joint STIPULATION AMENDMENT TO STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 35 Order by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Rovner, Philip)
October 23, 2009 CORRECTING ENTRY: Notices setting forth both a motion hearing date (November 19, 2009), and statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 have been added as attachments to D.I. 127 (MOTION for Leave to Amend its Responsive Pleading to Add a Counterclaim of False Marking) and D.I. 130 (MOTION to Stay Pending Reexamination of U.S. Patent No. 7,139,761). (nms)
October 23, 2009 137 NOTICE of by Facebook Inc. re 83 Declaration, 82 Objections, 84 Declaration Notice of Withdrawal of Defendant Facebook Inc.'s Objections to July 28, 2009 Order of Magistrate Judge Stark (Caponi, Steven)
October 23, 2009 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark - Telephone Conference held on 10/23/2009. (Court Reporter K. Maurer.) (ntl)
October 22, 2009 136 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Facebook's Second of Requests for Admissions to Leader Technologies, Inc.'s, its Fourth Set of Requests for Production of Documents to Leader Technologies, and its Sixth Set of Interrogatories to Leader Technologies, Inc. by Facebook Inc..(Caponi, Steven)
October 22, 2009 135 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Facebook's Third Set of Requests for Production of Documents to Leader Technologies, Inc. and Its Fifth Set of Interrogatories to Leader Technologies, Inc. by Facebook Inc..(Caponi, Steven)
October 22, 2009 134 SEALED Letter to The Hon. Leonard P. Stark from Steven L. Caponi, counsel for Defendant Facebook, Inc. regarding Response to October 21, 2009 letter from Plaintiff Leader Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-H)(Caponi, Steven) Modified on 10/23/2009 (nms).
October 22, 2009 133 SEALED Letter to THE HONORABLE LEONARD P. STARK from PHILIP A. ROVNER, ESQ. regarding OPPOSITION LETTER RE DISCOVERY DISPUTE PER OCTOBER 16, 2009 ORDER - re 124 Letter, 122 Order Setting Teleconference. (Rovner, Philip)
October 21, 2009 132 DECLARATION of Jeffrey Norberg re 130 MOTION to Stay Pending Reexamination of U.S. Patent No. 7,139,761 by Facebook Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Caponi, Steven) Modified on 10/22/2009 (nms).
October 21, 2009 131 OPENING BRIEF in Support re 130 MOTION to Stay Pending Reexamination of U.S. Patent No. 7,139,761 filed by Facebook Inc.(a Delaware corporation).Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 11/9/2009. (Caponi, Steven)
October 21, 2009 130 MOTION to Stay Pending Reexamination of U.S. Patent No. 7,139,761 - filed by Facebook Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Motion, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Caponi, Steven) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/23/2009: # 3 Notice of Motion and 7.1.1 Statement) (nms).
October 21, 2009 129 DECLARATION of Jeffrey Norberg re 127 MOTION for Leave to Amend its Responsive Pleading to Add a Counterclaim of False Marking by Facebook Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Caponi, Steven) Modified on 10/22/2009 (nms).
October 21, 2009 128 OPENING BRIEF in Support re 127 MOTION for Leave to Amend its Responsive Pleading to Add a Counterclaim of False Marking filed by Facebook Inc.(a Delaware corporation).Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 11/9/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Caponi, Steven) Modified on 10/22/2009 (nms).
October 21, 2009 127 MOTION for Leave to Amend its Responsive Pleading to Add a Counterclaim of False Marking - filed by Facebook Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Motion, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Caponi, Steven) Modified on 10/22/2009 (nms). (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/23/2009: # 3 Notice of Motion and 7.1.1 Statement) (nms).
October 21, 2009 126 NOTICE OF SERVICE of PLAINTIFF LEADER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S THIRD SET OF REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION TO DEFENDANT FACEBOOK, INC. (NOS. 1-62); PLAINTIFF LEADER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S FIFTH SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT FACEBOOK, INC. (NOS. 19-33); PLAINTIFF LEADER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S FOURTH SET OF REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND THINGS TO DEFENDANT FACEBOOK, INC. (NOS. 79-177) re 112 Notice of Service,, 118 Notice of Service, by Leader Technologies Inc.. Related document: 112 Notice of Service,, filed by Leader Technologies Inc., 118 Notice of Service, filed by Leader Technologies Inc..(Rovner, Philip)
October 21, 2009 125 SEALED Letter to THE HONORABLE LEONARD P. STARK from PHILIP A. ROVNER, ESQ. regarding DISCOVERY DISPUTE - IN ACCORDANCE WITH OCTOBER 16, 2009 ORDER - re 122 Order Setting Teleconference. (Rovner, Philip) Modified on 10/22/2009 (nms).
October 21, 2009 124 SEALED Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Steven L. Caponi, counsel for Defendant Facebook, Inc. and Exhibits A-F filed under seal in their entirety regarding Discovery dispute regarding Defendant's Interrogatory Nos. 4 and 11 - re 122 Order Setting Teleconference. (Caponi, Steven)
October 16, 2009 123 NOTICE OF SERVICE of LEADER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S RESPONSES TO FACEBOOK, INC.'S SECOND SET OF REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO LEADER TECHNOLOGIES, INC. (49-80) re 117 Notice of Service by Leader Technologies Inc.. Related document: 117 Notice of Service filed by Facebook Inc..(Rovner, Philip)
October 16, 2009 122 Order Setting Teleconference: Discovery Telephone Conference set for 10/23/2009 11:00 AM before Judge Leonard P. Stark. ( Please see Order for complete details regarding Letter Submission(s) ). Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/16/2009. (rpg)
October 15, 2009 121 NOTICE OF SERVICE of LEADER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S RESPONSES TO FACEBOOK, INC.'S FOURTH SET OF INTERROGATORIES (NOS. 12-18); LEADER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE TO FACEBOOK, INC.'S INTERROGATORIES NO. 1 re 24 Notice of Service, 116 Notice of Service by Leader Technologies Inc.. Related document: 24 Notice of Service, filed by Leader Technologies Inc., 116 Notice of Service filed by Facebook Inc..(Rovner, Philip)
October 8, 2009 120 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Responses to Plaintiff's Third Set of Interrogatories and Responses to Plaintiff's Second Set of Requests for Admissions by Facebook Inc..(Caponi, Steven)
October 2, 2009 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 108 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney JAMES HANNAH, ESQ., KING & SPALDING filed by Leader Technologies Inc.. Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 10/2/2009. (nms)
October 2, 2009 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 119 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jeffrey Norberg filed by Facebook Inc.. Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 10/2/2009. (nms)
September 30, 2009 119 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jeffrey Norberg - filed by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Certification)(Caponi, Steven)
September 28, 2009 118 Notice of Service of Plaintiff Leader Technologies, Inc.'S Fourth Set of Interogatories to Defendant Facebook, Inc. (No. 18); Plaintiff Leader Technoilogies, Inc.'S Third Set of Requests for Production of Documents and Things to Defendant Facebook, Inc. (No. 75-78), filed by Leader Technologies Inc..(Rovner, Philip) Modified on 9/29/2009 (nms).
September 17, 2009 117 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Facebook, Inc.'s Second Set of Requests For Production of Documents to Leader Technologies, Inc. by Facebook Inc..(Caponi, Steven)
September 16, 2009 116 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Facebook, Inc.'s Fourth Set of Interrogatories to Leader Technologies, Inc. by Facebook Inc..(Caponi, Steven)
September 15, 2009 115 NOTICE OF SERVICE of LEADER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE TO FACEBOOK, INC.'S INTERROGATORY NO. 9 re 31 Notice of Service, by Leader Technologies Inc.. Related document: 31 Notice of Service, filed by Leader Technologies Inc..(Rovner, Philip)
September 10, 2009 114 REDACTED VERSION of 103 Letter, Sealed letter of September 2, 2009 to Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Steven L. Caponi, counsel for Defendant Facebook, Inc., regarding discovery dispute and Exhibit A - redacted in their entirety by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven)
September 10, 2009 113 REDACTED VERSION of 101 Letter, Redaction Notice, SEALED Letter of September 1, 2009 to the Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Steven L. Caponi, counsel for Defendant Facebook, Inc. regarding response to Plaintiff's August 27 letter and sealed Exhibits A-F - redacted in their entirety by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven)
September 10, 2009 REDACTION NOTICE: In accordance with section G of the Administrative Procedures Governing Filing and Service by Electronic Means, redacted versions of sealed documents shall be filed electronically within 5 business days of the filing of the sealed document. The records of this case do not reflect the filing of a redacted version of DI # 101 . (nms)
September 4, 2009 112 NOTICE OF SERVICE of PLAINTIFF LEADER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S THIRD SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT FACEBOOK, INC.; PLAINTIFF LEADER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S SECOND SET OF REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION TO DEFENDANT FACEBOOK, INC. (NOS. 35-40); LEADER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S RESPONSE TO FACEBOOK INC.'S INTERROGATORY NO. 11; LEADER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S OBJECTIONS AND RESPONSES TO FACEBOOK INC.'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (1-20) SET ONE re 81 Notice of Service, 32 Notice of Service, by Leader Technologies Inc.. Related document: 81 Notice of Service filed by Facebook Inc., 32 Notice of Service, filed by Leader Technologies Inc..(Rovner, Philip)
September 4, 2009 111 Featured Case ORDER Regarding Discovery Matters. ( Please see Order for complete details ). Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/4/2009. (rpg)
September 4, 2009 110 COPY of Official Transcript of Discovery Telephone Conference held on 8/20/2009 before Judge Stark. See DI 523 . (rpg) Modified on 6/11/2010 (maw).
September 4, 2009 109 NOTICE of Change of Address by Steven L. Caponi (Caponi, Steven)
September 4, 2009 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark - Telephone Conference held on 9/4/2009. (Court Reporter Hawkins Reporting Service.) (rpg)
September 4, 2009 108 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney JAMES HANNAH, ESQ., KING & SPALDING - filed by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Rovner, Philip)
September 3, 2009 107 REDACTED VERSION of 98 Letter PUBLIC VERSION OF LETTER TO THE HONORABLE LEONARD P. STARK FROM PHILIP A. ROVNER RE AUGUST 20, 2009 ORDER, WITH EXHIBITS A-E by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Rovner, Philip)
September 3, 2009 Remark: Exhibits A-C re 106 have been removed and replaced with updated PDF per counsel's telephone request. (rpg)
September 3, 2009 106 Letter to THE HONORABLE LEONARD P. STARK from PHILIP A. ROVNER, ESQ. regarding RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S LETTER - re 103 Letter,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-C)(Rovner, Philip) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/3/2009: # 1 Exhibits A - C) (rpg).
September 3, 2009 105 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Steven L. Caponi, counsel for Defendant Facebook, Inc. regarding Defendant Facebook, Inc.'s letter response to Plaintiff Leader Technologies, Inc.'s September 2, 2009 letter - re 101 Letter, 103 Letter, 102 Letter, 104 Letter, 96 Order Setting Teleconference. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Caponi, Steven) Modified on 9/8/2009 (nms).
September 2, 2009 104 Letter to THE HONORABLE LEONARD P. STARK from PHILIP A. ROVNER, ESQ. regarding REPLY LETTER PURSUANT TO AUGUST 20, 2009 ORDER - re 101 Letter, 93 Order,. (Rovner, Philip)
September 2, 2009 103 SEALED Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Steven L. Caponi, counsel for Defendant Facebook, Inc. regarding Discovery dispute re Interrogatory No. 9 and in preparation of conference call with Judge Stark on 9-4 - re 102 Letter, 96 Order Setting Teleconference. (Attachment: # 1 Exhibit A)(Caponi, Steven) Modified on 9/3/2009 (nms).
September 2, 2009 102 Letter to THE HONORABLE LEONARD P. STARK from PHILIP A. ROVNER, ESQ. regarding DISCOVERY DISPUTE - re 96 Order Setting Teleconference. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-6)(Rovner, Philip)
September 1, 2009 101 SEALED Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Steven L. Caponi, counsel for Defendant Facebook, Inc. regarding Defendant's response to 98 Plaintiff's August 27 letter, and pursuant to 93 Court Order of August 21, 2009. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-F)(Caponi, Steven) Modified on 9/2/2009 (nms).
August 28, 2009 100 REDACTED VERSION of 95 Declaration of Rowena Young in Support of Response in Opposition to Facebook's Objections to July 28, 2009 Order of Magistrate Judge Stark with Exhibits 1-4 by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Rovner, Philip) Modified on 8/31/2009 (nms).
August 28, 2009 99 Redacted Version of 94 Objections/response in Opposition to Facebook Inc.'S Objections to the July 28, 2009 Order of Magistrate Judge Stark by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Rovner, Philip) Modified on 8/31/2009 (nms).
August 27, 2009 98 SEALED Letter to THE HONORABLE LEONARD P. STARK from PHILIP A. ROVNER, ESQ. regarding LETTER PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER OF AUGUST 20, 2009 - re 93 Order,. (Rovner, Philip)
August 27, 2009 97 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Facebook, Inc.'s First Supplemental Responses to Plaintiff Leader Technologies, Inc.'s Interrogatory No. 14 re 32 Notice of Service, by Facebook Inc.. Related document: 32 Notice of Service, filed by Leader Technologies Inc..(Caponi, Steven)
August 26, 2009 96 Order Setting Teleconference: Discovery Telephone Conference set for 9/4/2009 11:00 AM before Judge Leonard P. Stark. ( Please see Order for complete details regarding Letter Submissions ). Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/26/2009. (rpg)
August 21, 2009 95 SEALED DECLARATION of Rowena Young re 94 Objections by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Rovner, Philip) Modified on 8/25/2009 (nms).
August 21, 2009 94 Sealed Response In Opposition to OBJECTIONS to 82 Objections and 78 ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE STARK. (Rovner, Philip) Modified on 8/25/2009 (nms).
August 20, 2009 93 Featured Case ORDER Staying re 78 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY MATTERS. ( Opening Letter submission by Leader due by 8/27/2009. Answering Letter Submission by Facebook due by 9/01/2009. Reply Letter by Leader due by 9/02/2009 ). Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/20/2009. (rpg)
August 20, 2009 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark - Telephone Conference held on 8/20/2009. (Court Reporter Edward N. Hawkins - Hawkins Rptg.) (ntl)
August 19, 2009 92 Letter to Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Thomas P. Preston and Steven L. Caponi, counsel for Defendant Facebook, Inc. regarding Defendant's letter in preparation for conference call with Judge Stark re discovery matters, scheduled for August 20, 2009 - re 91 Letter, 90 Order Setting Teleconference. (Preston, Thomas)
August 18, 2009 91 Letter to THE HONORABLE LEONARD P. STARK from PHILIP A. ROVNER, ESQ. regarding LETTER PRIOR TO TELECONFERENCE TO ADDRESS FACEBOOK REQUEST FOR STAY - re 78 Order, 90 Order Setting Teleconference, 85 Letter,. (Rovner, Philip)
August 13, 2009 90 Order Setting Teleconference: Discovery Telephone Conference set for 8/20/2009 02:00 PM before Judge Leonard P. Stark. ( Please see Order for details regarding letter submissions ). Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/13/2009. (rpg)
August 13, 2009 89 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoena by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Subpoena)(Caponi, Steven)
August 13, 2009 88 REDACTED VERSION of 83 Declaration of Stephen Gray in Support of Defendant's Objections to July 28, 2009 Order of Magistrate Judge Stark by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven)
August 13, 2009 87 REDACTED VERSION of 84 Declaration of Craig W. Clark in Support of Defendant's Objections to July 28, 2009 Order of Magistrate Judge Stark by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A - F)(Caponi, Steven)
August 13, 2009 86 REDACTED VERSION of 82 Objections Defendant's Objections to July 28, 2009 Order of Magistrate Judge Stark by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven)
August 12, 2009 85 Letter to Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Steven L. Caponi, counsel for Defendant Facebook, Inc. regarding Defendant's request that the Court stay execution of the Court's July 28, 2009 Order Regarding Discovery Matters (D.I. 78) - re 78 Order, 82 Objections. (Caponi, Steven)
August 10, 2009 84 SEALED DECLARATION of Craig W. Clark re 82 Objections to the Order dated July 28, 2009 by Magistrate Judge Stark (Exhibits A-F) by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven) Modified on 8/11/2009 (nms).
August 10, 2009 83 SEALED DECLARATION of Stephen Gray re 82 Objections by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven) Modified on 8/11/2009 (nms).
August 10, 2009 82 SEALED OBJECTIONS by Facebook Inc. to 78 Order dated July 28, 2009 by Magistrate Judge Stark. (Caponi, Steven) Modified on 8/11/2009 (nms).
August 5, 2009 81 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Facebook, Inc.'s Third Set of Interrogatories to Leader Technologies, Inc. and Facebook, Inc.'s First Set of Requests for Admissions to Leader Technologies, Inc. by Facebook Inc..(Caponi, Steven)
July 30, 2009 80 REDACTED VERSION of 74 Letter PUBLIC VERSION OF LETTER TO THE HONORABLE LEONARD P. STARK WITH EXHIBITS A-B by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Rovner, Philip)
July 29, 2009 79 NOTICE to Take Deposition of FACEBOOK, INC. (30(b)(6) on AUGUST 10, 2009 by Leader Technologies Inc..(Rovner, Philip)
July 28, 2009 78 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY MATTERS re 74 SEALED Letter to THE HONORABLE LEONARD P. STARK from PHILIP A. ROVNER, ESQ. regarding LETTER BRIEF TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND SOURCE CODE, re 75 Letter to the Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Steven L. Caponi, counsel to Defendant Facebook, Inc. regarding supplemental letter regarding discovery issues. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/28/2009. (rpg)
July 24, 2009 77 Official Transcript of Teleconference held on 07-14-09 before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter/Transcriber Heather Triozzi. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/14/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/24/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/22/2009. (lad)
July 24, 2009 75 Letter to the Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Steven L. Caponi, counsel to Defendant Facebook, Inc. regarding supplemental letter regarding discovery issues - re 73 Letter, Telephone Conference, 74 Letter. (Caponi, Steven)
July 23, 2009 76 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER: Case referred to the Magistrate Judge Stark for discovery. Joinder of Parties due by 8/21/2009. Amended Pleadings due by 11/20/2009. Interrogatories, identification of fact witnesses, and document production due by 11/20/2009. Dispositive Motions due by 5/1/2010. Markman Hearing set for 1/20/2010 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr.. Pretrial Conference set for 6/3/2010. Jury Trial set for 6/28/2010 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr.. Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 7/23/2009. (nms)
July 23, 2009 74 SEALED Letter to THE HONORABLE LEONARD P. STARK from PHILIP A. ROVNER, ESQ. regarding LETTER BRIEF TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND SOURCE CODE - re Telephone Conference. (Rovner, Philip)
July 23, 2009 73 Letter to the Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Steven L. Caponi, counsel to Defendant Facebook, Inc. regarding unresolved discovery matters - re Telephone Conference. (Caponi, Steven)
July 22, 2009 72 Official Transcript of Motion Hearing held on 05-28-09 before Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. Court Reporter/Transcriber Deanna Warner. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/12/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/24/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/20/2009. (lad)
July 14, 2009 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark - Telephone Conference held on 7/14/2009. (Court Reporter Heather Triozzi - Hawkins Rptg.) (ntl)
July 13, 2009 71 NOTICE OF SERVICE of SUBPOENA ON THINK COMPUTER CORPORATION PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 45 by Leader Technologies Inc..(Rovner, Philip)
July 13, 2009 70 NOTICE OF SERVICE of SUBPOENA ON CONNECTU, INC. PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 45 by Leader Technologies Inc..(Rovner, Philip)
July 10, 2009 69 EXHIBIT re 68 Letter Exhibit to Letter dated July 10, 2009 to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Pt. 2))(Rovner, Philip)
July 10, 2009 68 Letter to Honorable Leonard P.Stark from Philip A. Rovner regarding Discovery Issues. (Rovner, Philip)
July 10, 2009 67 Letter to Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Counsel for Defendant Facebook, Inc. regarding Opposition to letter brief of Plaintiff Leader Technology, Inc. (D.I. 65) - re 65 Letter. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B , # 3 Exhibit C)(Caponi, Steven) Modified on 7/13/2009 (nms).
July 9, 2009 66 Letter to Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Steven L. Caponi, counsel for Defendant Facebook, Inc. regarding discovery dispute - re 65 Letter, Terminate Motions,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A-C to letter brief to Hon. Leonard P. Stark)(Caponi, Steven)
July 9, 2009 65 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Philip A. Rovner regarding Discovery Issues - re 32 Notice of Service, 58 Notice of Service,,. (Rovner, Philip)
July 7, 2009 64 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoenas issued to Autonomy, Inc. and Interwoven, Inc. to produce documents and things by Facebook Inc.(a Delaware corporation).(Caponi, Steven)
July 2, 2009 63 Order Setting Teleconference: Discovery Telephone Conference set for 7/14/2009 02:30 PM before Judge Leonard P. Stark. ( Please see order for complete details regarding letters ). Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/2/2009. (rpg)
June 12, 2009 62 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY MATTER PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 6/12/2009. (rpg)
June 11, 2009 61 Letter to Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Steven L. Caponi, counsel for Defendant Facebook, Inc. regarding request of all parties for a brief status conference regarding procedures for raising pre-trial matters with the Court - re 59 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,. (Caponi, Steven)
June 8, 2009 60 NOTICE OF SERVICE of LEADER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE TO FACEBOOK, INC.'S INTERROGATORY NO. 10 re 33 Notice of Service, by Leader Technologies Inc.. Related document: 33 Notice of Service, filed by Leader Technologies Inc..(Rovner, Philip)
May 28, 2009 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. - Motion Hearing held on 5/28/2009 re 36 MOTION to Compel Facebook, Inc. To Respond To Leader's First Set of Requests for Production of Documents and Things and Leader's First Set of Interrogatories filed by Leader Technologies Inc.. The Motion will be Denied as Moot for the reasons stated on the record. All discovery disputes in this matter will be referred to Magistrate Judge Stark. (Court Reporter Deanna (Hawkins Reporting Service).(nms)
May 28, 2009 59 Featured Case ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Leonard P. Stark for the purpose of resolving all discovery disputes (*The Court will suspend its non-case dispositive motions procedure due to this referral). Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 5/28/2009. (nms)
May 28, 2009 Motion terminated: D.I. 36 LEADER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S MOTION TO COMPEL FACEBOOK, INC. TO RESPOND TO LEADER'S FIRST SET OF REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND THINGS AND LEADER'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES filed by Leader Technologies Inc. is DENIED AS MOOT per 5/28/09 Motion Day Hearing.(dlk)
May 28, 2009 MOTION REFERRED: D.I. 54 MOTION to Compel referred to Leonard P. Stark.(dlk)
May 22, 2009 58 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Facebooks, Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's Second Set of Requests for Production of Documents (No. 74); Facebook, Inc.'s Objectoins and Responses to Plaintiff Leader Technologies, Inc.'s Second Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 14-17); and Facebook, Inc.'s Response to Leader Technologies, Inc.'s First Set of Requests for Admission (Nos. 1-34) re 32 Notice of Service, by Facebook Inc.(a Delaware corporation). Related document: 32 Notice of Service, filed by Leader Technologies Inc..(Caponi, Steven)
May 21, 2009 57 REPLY Brief re 36 MOTION to Compel FACEBOOK, INC. TO RESPOND TO LEADER'S FIRST SET OF REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND THINGS AND LEADER'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES filed by Facebook Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Unreported Cases Cited in Defendant's Reply Brief in Support of Motion for Order Compelling Response to Facebook Interrogatory No. 1)(Preston, Thomas) Modified on 5/26/2009 (nms).
May 20, 2009 56 DECLARATION re 55 Opening Brief in Support, 54 MOTION to Compel and Notice of Motion, to be heard on June 18, 2009 at 10:00 a.m. of Craig W. Clark in Support of Defendant's Motion for Order Compelling Response to Facebook Interrogatory No. 10 by Facebook Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration of Craig W. Clark, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Declaration of Craig W. Clark, # 3 Exhibit Exhibits C-G to Declaration of Craig W. Clark)(Preston, Thomas)
May 20, 2009 55 OPENING BRIEF in Support re 54 MOTION to Compel and Notice of Motion, to be heard on June 18, 2009 at 10:00 a.m. filed by Facebook Inc.(a Delaware corporation).Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 6/8/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Unreported Cases Cited in Defendant's Opening Brief in Support of Motion for Order Compelling Response to Facebook Interrogatory No. 10)(Preston, Thomas)
May 20, 2009 54 MOTION to Compel and Notice of Motion, to be heard on June 18, 2009 at 10:00 a.m. - filed by Facebook Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Compelling Plaintiff's and Counterdefendant's Response to Facebook Interrogatory No. 10)(Preston, Thomas)
May 20, 2009 53 DECLARATION re 52 Reply Brief, DECLARATION OF LISA KOBIALKA IN SUPPORT OF LEADER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION AND FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES WITH EXHIBITS A-C by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Rovner, Philip)
May 20, 2009 52 REPLY BRIEF re 36 MOTION to Compel LEADER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S MOTION TO COMPEL FACEBOOK, INC. TO RESPOND TO LEADER'S FIRST SET OF REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND THINGS AND LEADER'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES filed by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Rovner, Philip)
May 18, 2009 51 DECLARATION of Stephen Gray re 48 Answering Brief re Motion for Order Compelling Response to Defendant's Interrogatory No. 1 by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration of Stephen Gray)(Caponi, Steven) Modified on 5/19/2009 (nms).
May 18, 2009 50 DECLARATION of Craig Clark re 48 Answering Brief re Motion to Compel Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Production and First Set of Interrogatories by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A-E to Declaration of Craig Clark)(Caponi, Steven) Modified on 5/19/2009 (nms).
May 18, 2009 49 Compendium of Unreported Decisions re 48 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven)
May 18, 2009 48 ANSWERING BRIEF re 36 MOTION to Compel TO RESPOND TO LEADER'S FIRST SET OF REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND THINGS AND LEADER'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES filed by Facebook Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 5/29/2009. (Caponi, Steven) Modified on 5/19/2009 (nms).
May 18, 2009 47 DECLARATION OF LISA KOBIALKA re 45 Answering Brief in Opposition TO MOTION COMPELLING LEADER'S RESPONSE TO FACEBOOK'S INTERROGATORY NO. by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-4)(Rovner, Philip) Modified on 5/19/2009 (nms).
May 18, 2009 46 DECLARATION OF PAUL ANDRE re 45 Answering Brief to MOTION COMPELLING LEADER'S RESPONSE TO FACEBOOK'S INTERROGATORY NO. 1 by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Rovner, Philip) Modified on 5/19/2009 (nms).
May 18, 2009 45 ANSWERING BRIEF re 38 in Opposition MOTION COMPELLING LEADER'S RESPONSE TO FACEBOOK'S INTERROGATORY NO. 1 filed by Leader Technologies Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 5/29/2009. (Rovner, Philip) Modified on 5/19/2009 (nms).
May 18, 2009 44 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Facebook, Inc.'s First Supplemental Responses to Plaintiff Leader Technologies, Inc.'s Interrogatory Nos. 3, 4, 6 and 10 re 18 Notice of Service, by Facebook Inc.. Related document: 18 Notice of Service, filed by Leader Technologies Inc..(Caponi, Steven)
May 14, 2009 43 REDACTED VERSION of 28 Exhibit to a Document, 27 Letter, by Facebook Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Caponi, Steven)
May 12, 2009 REDACTION NOTICE: In accordance with section G of the Administrative Procedures Governing Filing and Service by Electronic Means, redacted versions of sealed documents shall be filed electronically within 5 business days of the filing of the sealed document. The records of this case do not reflect the filing of a redacted version of DI # 28 . (nms)
May 7, 2009 42 REDACTED VERSION of 37 Declaration, PUBLIC VERSION OF DECLARATION OF LISA KOBIALKA IN SUPPORT OF LEADER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S MOTION TO COMPEL FACEBOOK, INC. TO RESPOND TO LEADER'S FIRST SET OF REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND THINGS AND LEADER'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16)(Rovner, Philip)
May 1, 2009 41 DECLARATION of Stephen Gray re 39 Opening Brief by Facebook Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Caponi, Steven) Modified on 5/4/2009 (nms).
May 1, 2009 40 DECLARATION of Craig Clark re 39 Opening Brief by Facebook Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-C, # 2 Exhibits D-I)(Caponi, Steven) Modified on 5/4/2009 (nms).
May 1, 2009 39 OPENING BRIEF in Support re 36 MOTION to Compel LEADER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S MOTION TO COMPEL FACEBOOK, INC. TO RESPOND TO LEADER'S FIRST SET OF REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND THINGS AND LEADER'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES filed by Facebook Inc.(a Delaware corporation).Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 5/18/2009. (Caponi, Steven)
May 1, 2009 38 NOTICE OF MOTION by Facebook Inc.(a Delaware corporation) re 36 MOTION to Compel LEADER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S MOTION TO COMPEL FACEBOOK, INC. TO RESPOND TO LEADER'S FIRST SET OF REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND THINGS AND LEADER'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES ; Requesting the following Motion Day: May 28, 2009 (Caponi, Steven)
May 1, 2009 Remark: Set Answer brief due date for D.I. 36 Motion to Compel Facebook, Inc. to Respond to Leader's First Set of Requests for Production of Documents and Things and Leader's First Set of Interrogatories. Answer brief due 5/18/2009. (nms)
April 30, 2009 37 SEALED DECLARATION of LISA KOBIALKA re 36 MOTION TO COMPEL FACEBOOK, INC. TO RESPOND TO LEADER'S FIRST SET OF REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND THINGS AND LEADER'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES (EXHIBITS 1-16) by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Rovner, Philip) Modified on 5/1/2009 (nms).
April 30, 2009 36 MOTION to COMPEL FACEBOOK, INC. TO RESPOND TO LEADER'S FIRST SET OF REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND THINGS AND LEADER'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES - filed by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Motion for May 28, 2009 motion list, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit Rule 7.1.1 Statement)(Rovner, Philip) Modified on 5/1/2009 (nms).
April 28, 2009 35 Featured Case ORDER Granting 34 Proposed Stipulated Protective Order filed by Leader Technologies Inc.. Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 4/28/2009. (nms)
April 27, 2009 34 PROPOSED STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER , by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Rovner, Philip) Modified on 4/28/2009 (nms).
April 24, 2009 33 NOTICE OF SERVICE of LEADER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S RESPONSE TO FACEBOOK, INC.'S SECOND SET OF INTERROGATORIES re 29 Notice of Service by Leader Technologies Inc.. Related document: 29 Notice of Service filed by Facebook Inc..(Rovner, Philip)
April 21, 2009 32 NOTICE OF SERVICE of PLAINTIFF LEADER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S SECOND SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT FACEBOOK, INC. (NOS. 14-17); PLAINTIFF LEADER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S SECOND SET OF REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND THINGS TO DEFENDANT FACEBOOK, INC. (NO. 74); PLAINTIFF LEADER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S FIRST SET OF REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION TO DEFENDANT FACEBOOK, INC. (NOS. 1-34) by Leader Technologies Inc..(Rovner, Philip)
April 17, 2009 31 NOTICE OF SERVICE of LEADER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSES TO FACEBOOK, INC.'S INTERROGATORIES NOS. 3 AND 9 re 24 Notice of Service, by Leader Technologies Inc.. Related document: 24 Notice of Service, filed by Leader Technologies Inc..(Rovner, Philip)
April 6, 2009 30 Joint PROPOSED ORDER Rule 16 Scheduling Order, by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Rovner, Philip) Modified on 4/7/2009 (nms).
March 31, 2009 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. - Status Conference held on 3/31/2009. The Parties discussed with the Court scheduling date conflicts. The Court provided the following dates to be used for the scheduling order: Trial in this matter will be reset to commence on 6/28/2010 at 9:30 a.m.. Fact Discovery will be due sometime during the month of November 2009. A Markman hearing will be held scheduled for 1/20/2010 at 10:00 a.m.. Expert Reports and Depositions will be due by mid April 2010. A Pre-trial Conference will be scheduled for either June 2 or 3rd 2010. Counsel was further instructed to submit to the Court a form of Order outlining these dates. (Court Reporter Leonard Dibbs.) (nms)
March 26, 2009 29 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Facebook, Inc.'s Second Set of Interrogatories to Leader Technologies, Inc. by Facebook Inc..(Caponi, Steven)
March 26, 2009 28 SEALED EXHIBIT re CORRECTING ENTRY:, 27 Letter, Leader Technologies, Inc.'s Responses to Facebook, Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories (1-9) by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven) (nms).
March 26, 2009 CORRECTING ENTRY: The Sealed Exhibit attached to D.I. 27 has been removed. Counsel has been called and advised to re-file the exhibit as a separate docket item entry with a link to the letter it is support of. (nms)
March 25, 2009 27 Letter to Honorable Joseph J. Farnan, Jr., from Steven L. Caponi, counsel for Defendant Facebook, Inc., regarding proposed scheduling as requested at the 3-3-09 Scheduling Conference - re 23 Transcript(Caponi, Steven) Modified on 3/26/2009 (nms).
March 25, 2009 26 Letter to THE HONORABLE JOSEPH J. FARNAN, JR. from PHILIP A. ROVNER, ESQ. regarding LEADER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER - re Scheduling Conference,. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Rule 16 Scheduling Order)(Rovner, Philip)
March 25, 2009 25 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Facebook, Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Plaintiff Leader Technologies, Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories (1-13) and Facebook, Inc.'s Response to Leader Technologies, Inc.'s First Set of Requests For Production of Documents (1-73) re 18 Notice of Service, by Facebook Inc.. Related document: 18 Notice of Service, filed by Leader Technologies Inc..(Caponi, Steven)
March 23, 2009 24 NOTICE OF SERVICE of LEADER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S RESPONSES TO FACEBOOK, INC.'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES (1-9); LEADER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S RESPONSES TO FACEBOOK, INC.;S FIRST SET OF REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO LEADER TECHNOLOGIES, INC. (1-48) re 17 Notice (Other) by Leader Technologies Inc.. Related document: 17 Notice (Other) filed by Facebook Inc..(Rovner, Philip)
March 6, 2009 23 Official Transcript of Scheduling Conference held on 03-03-09 before Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. Court Reporter/Transcriber Deanna Warner. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/27/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/6/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/4/2009. (lad)
March 4, 2009 22 NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosures by Facebook Inc. (Caponi, Steven)
March 3, 2009 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. - Scheduling Conference held on 3/3/2009. The Court anticipates a Sept./Oct. Markman hearing date. A trial will be scheduled for June 7, 2010. Ten days will be allocated for the trial, which may be adjusted as the trial date gets closer. Counsel shall confer and submit a form of Order by March 25, 2009. (Court Reporter Darlene (Hawkins Reporting Service).) (nms)
March 3, 2009 21 NOTICE OF SERVICE of PLAINTIFF LEADER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S INITIAL DISCLOSURES TO DEFENDANT FACEBOOK, INC., filed by Leader Technologies Inc..(Rovner, Philip) Modified on 3/4/2009 (nms).
February 27, 2009 20 Letter to THE HONORABLE JOSEPH J. FARNAN, JR. from PHILIP A. ROVNER, ESQ. regarding [PROPOSED] RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER - re 19 Proposed Order. (Rovner, Philip)
February 27, 2009 19 Joint PROPOSED ORDER [PROPOSED] RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER re 15 Order, Set Hearings by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Rovner, Philip)
February 20, 2009 18 NOTICE OF SERVICE of PLAINTIFF LEADER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT FACEBOOK, INC. (NOS. 1-13); PLAINTIFF LEADER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S FIRST SET OF REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND THINGS TO DEFENDANT FACEBOOK, INC. (1-73) by Leader Technologies Inc..(Rovner, Philip)
February 19, 2009 17 NOTICE of Service of First Set of Requests for Production of Documents and First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff by Facebook Inc.(a Delaware corporation) (Caponi, Steven)
February 18, 2009 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 16 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Dennis P. McCooe filed by Facebook Inc.. Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 2/18/2009. (nms)
February 17, 2009 16 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Dennis P. McCooe - filed by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certification, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Caponi, Steven)
February 12, 2009 15 Featured Case ORDER, Setting Hearings( Scheduling Conference set for 3/3/2009 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr.). Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 2/12/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Form Order)(nms)
February 9, 2009 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 14 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney PAUL J. ANDRE, ESQ. AND LISA KOBIALKA, ESQ. filed by Leader Technologies Inc.. Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 2/9/2009. (nms)
February 5, 2009 14 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney PAUL J. ANDRE, ESQ. AND LISA KOBIALKA, ESQ. - filed by Leader Technologies Inc.. (Rovner, Philip)
January 30, 2009 13 ANSWER to 12 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim LEADER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S REPLY TO FIRST AMENDED COUNTERCLAIMS OF DEFENDANT FACEBOOK, INC. by Leader Technologies Inc..(Rovner, Philip)
January 28, 2009 12 AMENDED ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against all plaintiffs by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven)
January 28, 2009 11 ANSWER to 5 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim LEADER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIMS OF DEFENDANT FACEBOOK, INC. by Leader Technologies Inc..(Rovner, Philip)
January 12, 2009 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Mark R. Weinstein filed by Facebook Inc.. Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 1/12/2009. (nms)
January 12, 2009 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Melissa H. Keyes filed by Facebook Inc.. Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 1/12/2009. (nms)
January 12, 2009 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Heidi L. Keefe filed by Facebook Inc.. Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 1/12/2009. (nms)
January 12, 2009 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Craig W. Clark filed by Facebook Inc.. Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 1/12/2009. (nms)
January 8, 2009 10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Mark R. Weinstein - filed by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven)
January 8, 2009 9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Melissa H. Keyes - filed by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven)
January 8, 2009 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Heidi L. Keefe - filed by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven)
January 8, 2009 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Craig W. Clark - filed by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven)
January 8, 2009 6 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven)
January 8, 2009 5 ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Leader Technologies Inc. by Facebook Inc..(Caponi, Steven)
November 26, 2008 Case assigned to Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. Please include the initials of the Judge (JJF) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
November 20, 2008 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Leader Technologies Inc.. Facebook Inc. served on 11/19/2008, answer due 12/9/2008. (Rovner, Philip)
November 20, 2008 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,139,761; (ead)
November 19, 2008 2 Notice of Availability of a U.S. Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction (ead)
November 19, 2008 Summons Issued as to Facebook Inc. on 11/19/2008. (ead)
November 19, 2008 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Facebook Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 154277.) - filed by Leader Technologies Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ead) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/20/2008: # 3 Acknowledgement of Consent Form) (ead).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leader Technologies Inc. v. Facebook Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leader Technologies Inc.
Represented By: Philip A. Rovner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?