Xerox Corporation v. Google Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Xerox Corporation
Defendant: Google Inc., Yahoo! Inc., YouTube Inc. and YouTube LLC
Case Number: 1:2010cv00136
Filed: February 19, 2010
Court: Delaware District Court
Office: Wilmington Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Unassigned Judge
Referring Judge: Mary Pat Thynge
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 15, 2011 292 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,778,979; 6,236,994. (ntl)
December 15, 2011 291 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 290 Stipulation and Order for Dismissal filed by Xerox Corporation, Yahoo! Inc., ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/14/11. (ntl)
December 13, 2011 290 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Yahoo! Inc. by Xerox Corporation, Yahoo! Inc.. (Maguire, Lauren)
November 18, 2011 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 287 Stipulation Amending Expert Discovery Schedule -- Dispositive Motions due by 3/9/2012. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 11/18/11. (ntl)
November 18, 2011 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 285 Stipulation of Dismissal as to defendant Google Inc. -- Attorney David Ellis Moore; David A. Perlson; Andrea P. Roberts; Charles K. Verhoeven; Richard L. Horwitz and Brian C. Howard terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 11/18/11. (ntl)
November 17, 2011 289 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Opening Expert Report of V.S. Subrahmanian Concerning Infringement of U.S. Patent 6,778,979 by Yahoo! Inc. by Xerox Corporation.(Mayo, Andrew)
November 16, 2011 288 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Expert Report of Professor C. Lee Giles by Yahoo! Inc..(Tigan, Jeremy)
November 14, 2011 CORRECTING ENTRY: d.i. 287 deleted and replaced per counsel's request on 11/14/2011. Notice of electronic filing re-generated to all counsel of record. (rpg)
November 11, 2011 287 STIPULATION amending expert discovery schedule by Xerox Corporation, Yahoo! Inc.. (Day, John) (rpg).
November 11, 2011 286 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Yahoo! Inc.'s Supplemental Responses to Interrogatories Nos. 6-7 of Xerox's First Set of Interrogatories by Yahoo! Inc..(Tigan, Jeremy)
November 11, 2011 285 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Claims Among Xerox and Google by Google Inc., Xerox Corporation. (Day, John)
November 7, 2011 284 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Andrew D. Hale as co-counsel. Reason for request: no longer with firm. (Mayo, Andrew)
October 26, 2011 283 Featured Case ORDER Setting Teleconference: Teleconference with Judge Thynge and Xerox only set for 11/7/2011 at 9:00 AM. Counsel for Xerox to initiate the call. Teleconference with Judge Thynge and Yahoo only set for 11/7/2011 at 11:00 AM. Counsel for Yahoo to initiate the call. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 10/26/2011. (cak)
October 24, 2011 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 282 Stipulation Regarding Amending Scheduling Order -- Dispositive Motions due by 3/2/2012. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/24/11. (ntl)
October 19, 2011 282 STIPULATION extending certain deadlines by Google Inc., Xerox Corporation, Yahoo! Inc.. (Day, John)
October 19, 2011 281 Featured Case ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the discovery teleconference scheduled for 10/24/11 at 2:15 PM is CANCELLED. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/19/11. (ntl)
October 17, 2011 280 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Third Supplemental Response to Interrogatory No. 8 of Xeroxs First Set of Interrogatories by Yahoo! Inc..(Tigan, Jeremy)
October 7, 2011 279 Amended NOTICE of Deposition of Eric Schulman by Xerox Corporation (Maguire, Lauren)
October 7, 2011 278 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Bahman Rabii on October 13, 2011 by Xerox Corporation.(Maguire, Lauren)
October 6, 2011 277 Featured Case ORDER Setting Teleconference : A Discovery Teleconference is set for 10/24/2011 at 02:15 PM. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/6/11. (ntl)
October 4, 2011 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 275 Stipulation Regarding Amending Scheduling Order: Dispositive Motions due by 2/17/2012. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/4/11. (ntl)
October 4, 2011 276 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Jeremy M. Brodsky as co-counsel. Reason for request: no longer with Davis Polk & Wardwell LLP. (Tigan, Jeremy)
October 4, 2011 CORRECTING ENTRY: D.I. 276 removed from the docket (filed in wrong case). (ntl)
October 3, 2011 275 STIPULATION Regarding Amending Scheduling Order by Google Inc.. (Horwitz, Richard)
September 30, 2011 274 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Third Supplemental Responses and Objections to Yahoo Inc.'s and Right Media LLC's Interrogatory No. 1 by Xerox Corporation.(Maguire, Lauren)
September 30, 2011 273 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Third Supplemental Responses and Objections to Google Inc.'s and YouTube LLC's Interrogatory No. 2 by Xerox Corporation.(Lydon, Tiffany)
September 30, 2011 272 Redaction of 265 Transcript, Telephone Conference held on August 23, 2011 before Judge Leonard Stark. Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER.(bpg)
September 22, 2011 271 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Supplemental Responses and Objections to Yahoo Inc.'s and Right Media's Interrogatory No. 1 by Xerox Corporation.(Maguire, Lauren)
September 19, 2011 270 Featured Case ORAL ORDER re 265 Sealed Transcript - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall submit a proposed redacted version of the 8/23/11 transcript within ten (10) days. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/19/11. (ntl)
September 19, 2011 CORRECTING ENTRY: the transcript at D.I. 265 was removed and placed under seal per Stipulation and Order at D.I. 269 . (ntl)
September 19, 2011 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 269 Stipulation and Order to Seal Hearing Transcript dated 8/23/11 (D.I. 265 ). Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/19/11. (ntl)
September 16, 2011 269 STIPULATION to Seal Hearing Transcript re 265 Transcript, by Google Inc.. (Moore, David)
September 15, 2011 268 NOTICE of Intent to Request Redaction by David Ellis Moore re 265 Transcript, (Moore, David)
September 14, 2011 267 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Google's Supplemental Objections and Responses to Xerox's Second Set of Interrogatories to Defendants (Nos. 12-14) by Google Inc..(Moore, David)
September 12, 2011 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 266 Stipulation Regarding Amending Scheduling Order: Discovery due by 9/9/2011, Dispositive Motions due by 1/27/2012. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/9/11. (ntl)
September 9, 2011 266 STIPULATION REGARDING AMENDING SCHEDULING ORDER re 115 Scheduling Order, 195 Stipulation by Google Inc.. (Horwitz, Richard)
September 8, 2011 265 {SEALED} Official Transcript of Telephone Conference held on August 23, 2011 before Judge Leonard Stark. Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/29/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/11/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/7/2011. (bpg) Modified on 9/19/2011 (ntl).
August 29, 2011 264 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Claudio Fanti on September 2, 2011 by Xerox Corporation.(Mayo, Andrew)
August 29, 2011 263 Amended NOTICE of Deposition of Shankar Ponnekanti by Xerox Corporation (Mayo, Andrew)
August 23, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark - Discovery Teleconference held on 8/23/2011. (Court Reporter B. Gaffigan.) (ntl)
August 19, 2011 262 REDACTED VERSION of 261 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from David E. Moore, Esquire regarding discovery dispute response (Filed on Behalf of Defendants) by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-13)(Moore, David)
August 19, 2011 261 SEALED Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from David E. Moore, Esquire regarding discovery dispute response - re 258 Letter. (Moore, David)
August 18, 2011 260 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Xerox's Responses and Objections to Google's Second Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 6-10) and Responses and Objections to Google's First Set of Requests for Admission (Nos. 1-15) by Xerox Corporation.(Day, John)
August 18, 2011 259 REDACTED VERSION of 258 Letter regarding Xerox's opening letter for August 23, 2011 discovery dispute teleconference by Xerox Corporation. (Day, John)
August 18, 2011 258 SEALED Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from John G. Day regarding Xerox's opening letter for August 23, 2011 discovery dispute teleconference. (Day, John)
August 15, 2011 257 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Yahoo! Inc.'s Supplemental Responses to Interrogatories Nos. 6-7 of Xerox's First Set of Interrogatories by Yahoo! Inc..(Tigan, Jeremy)
August 15, 2011 256 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Google's Third Supplemental Initial Disclosures and Supplemental Objections and Responses to First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 6-7) by Google Inc..(Moore, David)
August 15, 2011 255 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel (Scott A. Leslie) by Xerox Corporation (Mayo, Andrew)
August 15, 2011 254 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Yahoo! Inc.'s Second Supplemental Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) by Yahoo! Inc..(Tigan, Jeremy)
August 12, 2011 253 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) Responses and Objections to Xerox's First Set of Requests for Admission and 2) Responses and Objections to Xerox's Second Set of Interrogatories by Yahoo! Inc..(Tigan, Jeremy)
August 12, 2011 252 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Google's Response to First Requests for Admission (Nos. 1-14) and Objections and Responses to Second Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 10-15) by Google Inc..(Moore, David)
August 12, 2011 251 NOTICE of Issuance of Subpoenas on IP Value Management, Kapu Kumar and Paul Riley by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-3)(Moore, David)
August 11, 2011 250 Featured Case ORDER Setting Teleconference : A Discovery Teleconference is set for 8/23/2011 at 12:00 PM. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/11/11. (ntl)
August 10, 2011 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Benjamin H. Diessel,Andrew D. Hale,Katherine H. Kunz for Xerox Corporation added for electronic noticing. (rbe)
August 9, 2011 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 246 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Andrew D. Hale filed by Xerox Corporation. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/9/11. (ntl)
August 8, 2011 249 REDACTED VERSION of 248 Notice (Other) (Notice of Deposition of Google Inc.) by Xerox Corporation. (Mayo, Andrew)
August 8, 2011 248 SEALED NOTICE of of Deposition of Google Inc. to be taken on August 18, 2011 by Xerox Corporation (Mayo, Andrew)
August 5, 2011 247 NOTICE of Subpoena directed to Leo Chang by Yahoo! Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit subpoena)(Tigan, Jeremy)
August 4, 2011 246 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Andrew D. Hale - filed by Xerox Corporation. (Mayo, Andrew)
August 1, 2011 245 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Responses to Interrogatories (Nos. 8-10) by Xerox Corporation.(Day, John)
August 1, 2011 244 NOTICE of Subpoena of John Rodkin by Yahoo! Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Tigan, Jeremy)
August 1, 2011 243 Featured Case ORDER regarding Claim Construction re 141 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION OPENING BRIEF OF DEFENDANTS filed by Google, re 142 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION OPENING BRIEF filed by Xerox Corporation, re 162 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ANSWERING BRIEF, 163 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ANSWERING BRIEF and DENYING Discovery Request re 202 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from David E. Moore, Esquire regarding discovery dispute. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/1/2011. (rpg)
August 1, 2011 242 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding Claim Construction re 141 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION OPENING BRIEF OF DEFENDANTS filed by Google, re 142 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION OPENING BRIEF filed by Xerox Corporation, re 162 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ANSWERING BRIEF, 163 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ANSWERING BRIEF and Discovery Matter re 202 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from David E. Moore, Esquire regarding discovery dispute. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/1/2011. (rpg)
July 29, 2011 241 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Eric Schulman on August 11, 2011 by Xerox Corporation.(Maguire, Lauren)
July 29, 2011 240 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Max Maxwell on August 11, 2011 by Xerox Corporation.(Maguire, Lauren)
July 29, 2011 239 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Shankar Ponnekanti on August 12, 2011 by Xerox Corporation.(Maguire, Lauren)
July 29, 2011 238 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Lisa McFall on August 9, 2011 by Xerox Corporation.(Maguire, Lauren)
July 29, 2011 237 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Person or Persons designated by Yahoo! Inc. on August 9, 2011 by Xerox Corporation.(Maguire, Lauren)
July 29, 2011 236 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Person or Persons designated by Google Inc. on August 10, 2011 by Xerox Corporation.(Maguire, Lauren)
July 22, 2011 235 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Jason Miller on August 2, 2011 by Xerox Corporation.(Day, John)
July 22, 2011 234 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Claire Cui on July 29, 2011 by Xerox Corporation.(Day, John)
July 22, 2011 233 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Christopher Chan on July 29, 2011 by Xerox Corporation.(Day, John)
July 22, 2011 232 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Reiner Kraft on July 28, 2011 by Xerox Corporation.(Day, John)
July 22, 2011 231 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Zengyan Zhang on July 27, 2011 by Xerox Corporation.(Day, John)
July 22, 2011 230 REDACTED VERSION of 229 Notice (Other) (Notice of Deposition of Yahoo! Inc.) by Xerox Corporation. (Day, John)
July 22, 2011 229 SEALED NOTICE of Deposition of Yahoo! Inc. to be taken on July 27, 2011 by Xerox Corporation (Day, John)
July 22, 2011 228 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Google Inc. on August 2, 2011 by Xerox Corporation.(Day, John)
July 22, 2011 227 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Google Inc. on July 29, 2011 by Xerox Corporation.(Day, John)
July 19, 2011 226 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Supplemental Initial Disclosures by Xerox Corporation.(Mayo, Andrew)
July 18, 2011 225 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Xerox Corporation on July 21, 2011 (Amended 30(b)(6) Notice) by Google Inc., Yahoo! Inc..(Horwitz, Richard)
July 18, 2011 224 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Michael Butler on July 21, 2011 by Google Inc., Yahoo! Inc..(Horwitz, Richard)
July 15, 2011 223 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Google Inc.'s Second Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff (Nos. 6-10), and Google Inc.'s First Set of Requests for Admission to Plaintiff (Nos. 1-15) by Google Inc..(Moore, David)
July 14, 2011 222 NOTICE of Issuance of Subpoena on NBC Universal by Google Inc. (Moore, David)
July 13, 2011 221 NOTICE OF SERVICE of First Set of Requests for Admission and Second Set of Interrogatories by Xerox Corporation.(Lydon, Tiffany)
July 12, 2011 220 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Supplemental Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) by Yahoo! Inc..(Tigan, Jeremy)
July 8, 2011 219 Official Transcript of Telephone Conference held on June 29, 2011 before Judge Stark. Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/29/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/8/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/6/2011. (bpg)
July 5, 2011 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 215 Stipulation and Order for Dismissal of defendants YouTube LLC, YouTube Inc. -- YouTube Inc. and YouTube LLC terminated. Attorney Lauren E. Maguire; David Ellis Moore; David A. Perlson; Charles K. Verhoeven; Richard L. Horwitz and Brian C. Howard terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/5/11. (ntl)
July 1, 2011 218 REDACTED VERSION of 207 Declaration (Declaration of Steven Shin) by Xerox Corporation. (Maguire, Lauren)
July 1, 2011 217 REDACTED VERSION of 206 Declaration (Declaration of Paul Schnose) by Xerox Corporation. (Maguire, Lauren)
July 1, 2011 216 REDACTED VERSION of 205 Letter by Xerox Corporation. (Maguire, Lauren)
June 30, 2011 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 211 Stipulation and Order for Dismissal of defendants Right Media Inc. and Right Media LLC; Attorney Maryellen Noreika; Jeremy Alexander Tigan; Jeremy M. Brodsky and David J. Lisson terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 6/30/11. (ntl)
June 30, 2011 215 STIPULATION of Dismissal [STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANTS YOUTUBE INC. AND YOUTUBE LLC] by YouTube Inc., YouTube LLC. (Moore, David)
June 30, 2011 214 REDACTED VERSION of 204 Appendix re 202 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from David E. Moore, Esquire regarding discovery dispute (Volume III, Ex.15 part 2) (Filed on Behalf of Defendants) by Google Inc.. (Moore, David)
June 30, 2011 213 REDACTED VERSION of 203 Appendix re 202 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from David E. Moore, Esquire regarding discovery dispute (Volume II, Ex.15 part 1) (Filed on Behalf of Defendants) by Google Inc.. (Moore, David)
June 30, 2011 212 REDACTED VERSION of 202 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from David E. Moore, Esquire regarding discovery dispute (Volume I) by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-4, # 2 Exhibit 5-10, # 3 Exhibit 11-14)(Moore, David)
June 29, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark - Discovery Teleconference held on 6/29/2011. (Court Reporter B. Gaffigan.) (ntl)
June 29, 2011 211 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Right Media Inc. and Right Media LLC by Right Media Inc., Right Media LLC, Xerox Corporation. (Noreika, Maryellen)
June 27, 2011 210 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Michel Gastaldo on July 1, 2011 by Google Inc., Yahoo! Inc..(Moore, David)
June 27, 2011 209 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Mathieu Chuat on June 29, 2011 by Google Inc., Yahoo! Inc..(Moore, David)
June 27, 2011 208 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Yutaka Yamauchi on July 1, 2011 by Google Inc., Yahoo! Inc..(Moore, David)
June 24, 2011 207 SEALED DECLARATION re 205 Letter (Declaration of Steve Shin) by Xerox Corporation. (Mayo, Andrew)
June 24, 2011 206 SEALED DECLARATION re 205 Letter (Declaration of Paul Schnose) by Xerox Corporation. (Mayo, Andrew)
June 24, 2011 205 SEALED Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Andrew C. Mayo regarding discovery dispute. (Mayo, Andrew)
June 23, 2011 204 SEALED APPENDIX re 202 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from David E. Moore, Esquire regarding discovery dispute (Volume III, Letter and Ex.15 part 2) (Filed on Behalf of Defendants) by Google Inc.. (Moore, David)
June 23, 2011 203 SEALED APPENDIX re 202 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from David E. Moore, Esquire regarding discovery dispute (Volume II, Letter and Ex.15 part 1) (Filed on Behalf of Defendants) by Google Inc.. (Moore, David)
June 23, 2011 202 SEALED Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from David E. Moore, Esquire regarding discovery dispute (Volume I, Letter and Exs.1-14). (Moore, David)
June 16, 2011 201 Featured Case ORDER Setting Teleconference : A Discovery Teleconference is set for 6/29/2011 at 02:30 PM. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 6/16/11. (ntl)
June 14, 2011 200 Interim STATUS REPORT by Google Inc., Right Media Inc., Right Media LLC, Xerox Corporation, Yahoo! Inc., YouTube Inc., YouTube LLC. (Day, John)
June 14, 2011 199 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Supplemental Initial Disclosures of Google Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) by Google Inc..(Moore, David)
June 13, 2011 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 198 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Katherine H. Kunz and Benjamin Diessel filed by Xerox Corporation. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 6/13/11. (ntl)
June 10, 2011 198 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Katherine H. Kunz and Benjamin Diessel - filed by Xerox Corporation. (Mayo, Andrew)
June 10, 2011 197 Official Transcript of Claim Construction Hearing held on May 19, 2011 before Judge Stark. Court Reporter Brian P. Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/1/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/11/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/8/2011. (bpg)
June 9, 2011 196 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Mark Chavira on June 14, 2011 by Xerox Corporation.(Maguire, Lauren)
June 9, 2011 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 195 Stipulation Regarding Amending Scheduling Order -- Discovery due by 8/15/2011, Dispositive Motions due by 12/16/2011. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 6/9/11. (ntl)
June 7, 2011 195 STIPULATION (Stipulation Regarding Amending Scheduling Order) by Google Inc.. (Horwitz, Richard)
June 6, 2011 194 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Responses and Objections to Interrogatories (Nos. 8-11) by Xerox Corporation.(Mayo, Andrew)
June 2, 2011 193 REDACTED VERSION of 192 Notice (Other) by Xerox Corporation. (Maguire, Lauren)
June 2, 2011 192 SEALED NOTICE of Deposition of Yahoo Inc. to be taken on June 29, 2011 by Xerox Corporation (Maguire, Lauren)
June 2, 2011 191 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Supplemental Responses and Objections to Defendants' Interrogatories (Nos. 1-6) and Supplemental Responses and Objections to Google Inc.'s and YouTube LLC's Interrogatory No. 4 by Xerox Corporation.(Maguire, Lauren)
May 26, 2011 190 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Google's Supplemental Objections and Responses to Xerox's First Set of Interrogatories (No. 8) by Google Inc..(Moore, David)
May 25, 2011 189 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Second Supplemental Response to Interrogatory No. 8 of Xerox's First Set of Interrogatories by Right Media Inc., Yahoo! Inc..(Tigan, Jeremy)
May 23, 2011 188 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Notice of Deposition of Laurence Hubert by Google Inc., Yahoo! Inc..(Moore, David)
May 20, 2011 187 REDACTED VERSION of 179 Letter by Xerox Corporation. (Maguire, Lauren)
May 20, 2011 186 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from John G. Day regarding Xerox's May 19, 2011 Markman Hearing slides. (Attachments: # 1 Markman Hearing Slides)(Day, John)
May 20, 2011 185 REDACTED VERSION of 180 Letter by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-6)(Tigan, Jeremy)
May 19, 2011 184 REDACTED VERSION of 178 Letter by Xerox Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-23)(Maguire, Lauren)
May 19, 2011 183 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Xerox Corporation (30(b)(6)) by Google Inc., Yahoo! Inc..(Moore, David)
May 19, 2011 182 REDACTED VERSION of 177 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from David E. Moore regarding discovery dispute by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-I, # 2 Exhibit J-Q)(Moore, David)
May 19, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark - Markman Hearing/Discovery Conference held on 5/19/2011. (Court Reporter B. Gaffigan.) (ntl)
May 18, 2011 181 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Maryellen Noreika regarding the parties' agreement with respect to construction of one of the previously disputed terms. (Noreika, Maryellen)
May 13, 2011 180 SEALED Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Jeremy A. Tigan regarding discovery dispute. (Tigan, Jeremy)
May 13, 2011 179 SEALED Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Lauren E. Maguire regarding discovery dispute - re 177 Letter. (Maguire, Lauren)
May 12, 2011 178 SEALED Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Lauren E. Maguire regarding defendants' invalidity contentions. (Maguire, Lauren)
May 12, 2011 177 SEALED Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from David E. Moore regarding discovery dispute - re 166 Order Cancelling Deadline, Set Hearings,,,,. (Moore, David)
May 12, 2011 176 Featured Case ORDER Setting Mediation Conferences: the mediation conferences with Judge Thynge set for Tuesday, September 27, 2011 at 9:30 a.m. AND Wednesday, September 28, 2011 at 9:30 a.m. have been rescheduled as follows: Monday, October 24, 2011 at 9:30 a.m. between plaintiff and defendants Yahoo and Right Media only, AND Monday, October 24, 2011 at 3:00 p.m. between plaintiff and defendants Google and YouTube only. The mediation statements are now due on or before Friday, October 14, 2011. Dress for the mediation is business casual. All other provisions of the Courts May 17, 2010 Order remains in full force and effect. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 5/12/2011. (cak)
May 11, 2011 175 NOTICE OF SERVICE of DEFENDANTS GOOGLE INC.'S FOURTH SUPPLEMENTAL OBJECTIONS AND RESPONSES TO XEROX'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANTS (NOS. 7) by Google Inc..(Moore, David)
May 11, 2011 174 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Yahoo! Inc. and Right Media LLC's Fourth Supplemental Response to Interrogatory No. 7 of Xerox's First Set of Interrogatories by Right Media LLC, Yahoo! Inc..(Tigan, Jeremy)
May 10, 2011 173 REDACTED VERSION of 172 Notice to Take Deposition by Xerox Corporation. (Maguire, Lauren)
May 10, 2011 172 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Google Inc. on May 26, 2011 (FILED UNDER SEAL) by Xerox Corporation.(Maguire, Lauren)
May 10, 2011 171 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Google's Objections to Xerox's Notice of Deposition of Google Inc. by Google Inc..(Moore, David)
May 3, 2011 170 REDACTED VERSION of 162 Claim Construction Answering Brief re 142 Claim Construction Opening Brief DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE BRIEF ON CLAIM CONSTRUCTION by Google Inc., Right Media Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit D through H and S-4 through S-8)(Horwitz, Richard)
May 3, 2011 169 NOTICE of Issuance of Subpoena upon DocuLabs, Inc. by Google Inc. (Moore, David)
May 3, 2011 168 REDACTED VERSION of 164 Objections to Claim Construction Tutorial by Xerox Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A part 1, # 2 Exhibit A part 2, # 3 Exhibit B - E)(Mayo, Andrew)
May 2, 2011 167 NOTICE OF SERVICE of DEFENDANTS' SECOND SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF XEROX CORPORATION (NOS. 8-11) by Google Inc., Right Media Inc., Yahoo! Inc..(Moore, David)
May 2, 2011 166 Featured Case ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED as follows: 1) The Markman Hearing scheduled for May 19, 2011 will begin at 8:30 AM. 2) The parties discovery dispute will also be heard during the May 19, 2011 hearing; opening letter submissions are due May 12, 2011; answering letter submissions are due May 13, 2011; the discovery teleconference scheduled for May 18, 2011 at 10:30 AM is CANCELLED. 3) The parties will each be given a total of 1.5 hours for argument on Markman issues and the discovery dispute. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/2/11. (ntl)
April 27, 2011 165 Order Setting Teleconference: Discovery Teleconference set for 5/18/2011 10:30 AM. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/27/11. (ntl)
April 26, 2011 164 OBJECTIONS by Xerox Corporation to 139 Letter (Sealed Objections to Defendants' Claim Construction Tutorial). (Day, John)
April 26, 2011 163 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ANSWERING BRIEF re 141 Claim Construction Opening Brief filed by Xerox Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11)(Day, John)
April 26, 2011 162 SEALED CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ANSWERING BRIEF re 142 Claim Construction Opening Brief DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE BRIEF ON CLAIM CONSTRUCTION WITH EXHIBITS filed by Google Inc., Right Media LLC, Yahoo! Inc.. (Horwitz, Richard)
April 26, 2011 161 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from John G. Day regarding May 19, 2011 Markman hearing. (Day, John)
April 25, 2011 160 REDACTED VERSION of 159 Notice to Take Deposition of Google Inc. by Xerox Corporation. (Mayo, Andrew)
April 25, 2011 159 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Google Inc. (Filed Under Seal) on May 12, 2011 by Xerox Corporation.(Mayo, Andrew)
April 25, 2011 158 REDACTED VERSION of 157 Notice to Take Deposition of Yahoo! Inc. and Right Media LLC by Xerox Corporation. (Mayo, Andrew)
April 25, 2011 157 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Yahoo! Inc. and Right Media LLC (Filed Under Seal) on May 3, 2011 by Xerox Corporation.(Mayo, Andrew)
April 25, 2011 156 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Krishnan Vishwanath on May 6, 2011 by Xerox Corporation.(Mayo, Andrew)
April 25, 2011 155 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Raghavendra Donamukkala on May 4, 2011 by Xerox Corporation.(Mayo, Andrew)
April 25, 2011 154 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Reiner Kraft on May 5, 2011 by Xerox Corporation.(Mayo, Andrew)
April 25, 2011 153 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Zengyan Zhang on May 3, 2011 by Xerox Corporation.(Mayo, Andrew)
April 20, 2011 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 152 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties to file their respective claim construction briefs, responses to technology tutorials, and the joint statement regarding expert testimony to April 26, 2011 filed by Right Media LLC, Google Inc., Xerox Corporation, Yahoo! Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/20/11. (ntl)
April 20, 2011 152 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties to file their respective claim construction briefs, responses to technology tutorials, and the joint statement regarding expert testimony to April 26, 2011 - filed by Google Inc., Right Media LLC, Xerox Corporation, Yahoo! Inc.. (Moore, David)
April 18, 2011 151 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Google's Third Supplemental Objections and Responses to Xerox's First Set of Interrogatories to Defendants (Nos. 7) by Google Inc..(Moore, David)
April 15, 2011 150 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Yahoo! Inc. and Right Media LLC's Third Supplemental Response to Interrogatory No. 7 of Xerox's First Set of Interrogatories by Right Media LLC, Yahoo! Inc..(Tigan, Jeremy)
April 13, 2011 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 149 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties responsive claim construction briefs, responses to technology tutorials, and joint statement on whether expert testimony will be needed at the Markman hearing to April 22, 2011 -- Claim Construction Answering Brief due by 4/22/2011. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/13/11. (ntl)
April 12, 2011 149 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties responsive claim construction briefs, responses to technology tutorials, and joint statement on whether expert testimony will be needed at the Markman hearing to April 22, 2011 - filed by Google Inc., Right Media LLC, Yahoo! Inc., YouTube Inc., YouTube LLC. (Moore, David)
April 6, 2011 148 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Thomas Zell on April 7, 2011 by Google Inc..(Moore, David)
April 4, 2011 147 REDACTED VERSION of 146 Notice (Other) by Xerox Corporation. (Maguire, Lauren)
April 4, 2011 146 Amended NOTICE of Deposition of Google Inc. (Filed Under Seal) by Xerox Corporation re 104 Notice to Take Deposition (Maguire, Lauren)
April 1, 2011 145 REDACTED VERSION of 141 Claim Construction Opening Brief by Google Inc., Right Media LLC, Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-C)(Moore, David)
March 29, 2011 144 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Supplemental Responses and Objections to Defendants' Interrogatory Nos. 1 and 6 by Xerox Corporation.(Maguire, Lauren)
March 29, 2011 143 DECLARATION re 141 Claim Construction Opening Brief [DECLARATION OF ANDREA PALLIOS ROBERTS] by Google Inc., Right Media LLC, Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-4)(Moore, David)
March 25, 2011 142 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION OPENING BRIEF filed by Xerox Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-D, # 2 Exhibit E-J, # 3 Appendix A)(Day, John)
March 25, 2011 141 SEALED CLAIM CONSTRUCTION OPENING BRIEF OF DEFENDANTS filed by Google Inc., Right Media LLC, Yahoo! Inc.. (Moore, David)
March 25, 2011 140 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Xerox Corporation on March 30, 2011, April 1, 2011 and April 7, 2011 by Google Inc..(Moore, David)
March 25, 2011 139 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from David E. Moore, Esquire regarding Technology Tutorial. (Moore, David)
March 25, 2011 138 Letter to The Honorable Lonard P. Stark from John G. Day regarding CD containing Plaintiff's Tutorial on Technology. (Day, John)
March 24, 2011 137 NOTICE of Issuance of Subpoenas upon Gregory T. Grefenstette and James G. Shanahan by Google Inc. and Yahoo! Inc. (Moore, David)
March 23, 2011 136 Official Transcript of Oral Argument Hearing held on February 28, 2011 before Judge Stark. Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan, Telephone number (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/13/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/25/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/21/2011. (bpg)
March 16, 2011 135 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Second Supplemental Responses and Objections to Yahoo! Inc.'s and Right Media LLC's Interrogatory No. 1 by Xerox Corporation.(Maguire, Lauren)
March 16, 2011 134 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Second Supplemental Responses and Objections to Google Inc.'s and YouTube LLC's Interrogatory No. 2 by Xerox Corporation.(Maguire, Lauren)
March 15, 2011 133 CLAIM Construction Chart by Google Inc., Right Media Inc., Right Media LLC, Xerox Corporation, Yahoo! Inc., YouTube Inc., YouTube LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Maguire, Lauren)
March 10, 2011 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 132 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to submit joint claim chart to March 15, 2011 filed by Right Media Inc., Right Media LLC, Google Inc., YouTube LLC, Xerox Corporation, YouTube Inc., Yahoo! Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/10/11. (ntl)
March 10, 2011 132 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to submit joint claim chart to March 15, 2011 - filed by Google Inc., Right Media Inc., Right Media LLC, Xerox Corporation, Yahoo! Inc., YouTube Inc., YouTube LLC. (Maguire, Lauren)
March 7, 2011 131 Official Transcript of Telephone Conference held on February 22, 2011 before Judge Stark. Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/28/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/7/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/6/2011. (bpg)
March 7, 2011 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 130 Stipulation and Order Dismissing All Pending Claims, Defenses, and Counterclaims Relating to the '994 Patent. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/7/11. (ntl)
March 3, 2011 130 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Claims Related to '994 Patent by Xerox Corporation. (Day, John)
March 1, 2011 129 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Eugene Novikov of Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP as co-counsel. Reason for request: no longer with firm. (Moore, David)
February 28, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark: denying 87 Motion to Stay; Oral Argument held on 2/28/2011. (Court Reporter B. Gaffigan.) (ntl)
February 25, 2011 128 REDACTED VERSION of 121 Letter by Xerox Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A part 1, # 2 Exhibit A part 2, # 3 Exhibit B - K)(Mayo, Andrew)
February 23, 2011 127 REDACTED VERSION of 126 Letter to The Honorable Judge Stark from Maryellen Noreika regarding Responses to Xerox's Interrogatories by Right Media LLC, Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-B)(Noreika, Maryellen)
February 23, 2011 126 SEALED Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Maryellen Noreika regarding Responses to Xerox's Interrogatories - re 123 Order,,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-B)(Noreika, Maryellen)
February 23, 2011 125 RESPONSE to Discovery Request from SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL OBJECTIONS AND RESPONSES TO XEROX'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANTS (NOS. 7) (SERVED ON FEBRUARY 18, 2011) [PER THE COURT'S 2/23/11 ORDER] by Google Inc., YouTube LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Chart A-1 through A-13)(Moore, David)
February 23, 2011 124 RESPONSE to Discovery Request from SUPPLEMENTAL SECOND OBJECTIONS AND RESPONSES TO XEROX'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANTS (NOS. 7-9) (SERVED ON JULY 12, 2010) [PER THE COURT'S 2/23/11 ORDER] by Google Inc., YouTube LLC.(Moore, David)
February 23, 2011 123 Featured Case ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Defendants Google Inc., You Tube Inc., Yahoo! Inc., Right Media Inc., and Right Media LLC shall file, no later than February 24, 2011, the responses to Plaintiff's Interrogatories seeking invalidity contentions, which Defendants referred to during the teleconference of February 22, 2011, and which were provided to Plaintiff in July of 2010 and recently supplemented. If any of these materials are filed under seal, Defendants shall provide a courtesy copy to the Court no later than 9 am on February 25, 2011. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 2/23/11. (ntl)
February 22, 2011 122 REDACTED VERSION of 117 Letter by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - D)(Tigan, Jeremy)
February 22, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark - Discovery Teleconference held on 2/22/2011. (Court Reporter B. Gaffigan.) (ntl)
February 18, 2011 121 SEALED Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from John G. Day regarding Xerox's infringement contentions. (Day, John)
February 18, 2011 120 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Google Inc. and YouTube LLC's Second Supplemental Objections and Responses to Xerox's First Set of Interrogatories to Defendants (Nos. 7) by Google Inc., YouTube LLC.(Moore, David)
February 17, 2011 119 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Yahoo! Inc. and Right Media LLC's Second Supplemental Response to Interrogatory No. 7 of Xerox's First Set of Interrogatories by Right Media LLC, Yahoo! Inc..(Tigan, Jeremy)
February 17, 2011 118 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Richard L. Horwitz, Esquire regarding discovery dispute. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Horwitz, Richard)
February 17, 2011 117 SEALED Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Maryellen Noreika regarding Xerox Inc.'s infringement contentions. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-D)(Noreika, Maryellen)
February 16, 2011 116 Official Transcript of Telephone Conference held on February 3, 2011 before Judge Stark. Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/9/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/21/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/17/2011. (bpg)
February 15, 2011 115 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER: Case referred to the Magistrate Judge for the purpose of exploring ADR. Discovery due by 7/1/2011. Status Report due by 6/14/2011. Dispositive Motions due by 10/21/2011. Claim Construction Opening Brief due by 3/25/2011. Claim Construction Answering Brief due by 4/15/2011. Markman Hearing set for 5/19/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6B before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 2/15/11. (ntl)
February 15, 2011 114 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Written Responses to Xerox's 30(b)(6) Deposition Topics by Right Media LLC, Yahoo! Inc..(Tigan, Jeremy)
February 15, 2011 113 Featured Case ORDER Setting Mediation Conferences: the mediation conferences with Judge Thynge have been rescheduled as follows: Tuesday, September 27, 2011 beginning at 9:30 a.m. between plaintiff and defendants Yahoo and Right Media only. Wednesday, September 28, 2011 beginning at 9:30 a.m. between plaintiff and defendants Google and YouTube only. The mediation statements are now due on or before Friday, September 16, 2010. Dress for the mediation is business casual. All other provisions of the Courts May 17, 2010 Order remains in full force and effect.. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 2/15/2011. (cak)
February 10, 2011 112 PROPOSED ORDER (Amended Proposed Scheduling Order) re 111 Letter by Xerox Corporation. (Mayo, Andrew)
February 10, 2011 111 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Andrew C. Mayo regarding the parties' proposed scheduling order. (Mayo, Andrew)
February 9, 2011 110 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Supplemental Responses to Yahoo Inc.'s and Right Media LLC's Interrogatory No. 1 and Supplemental Responses to Google Inc.'s and YouTube LLC's Interrogatory Nos. 1 and 2 by Xerox Corporation.(Mayo, Andrew)
February 7, 2011 109 REDACTED VERSION of 108 Notice to Take Deposition by Xerox Corporation. (Mayo, Andrew)
February 7, 2011 108 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Yahoo! Inc. and Right Media LLC on March 1, 2011 (Filed Under Seal) by Xerox Corporation.(Mayo, Andrew)
February 3, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark - Scheduling Teleconference held on 2/3/2011. (Court Reporter B. Gaffigan.) (ntl)
February 3, 2011 107 Order Setting Teleconference: Discovery Teleconference set for 2/22/2011 11:15 AM before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 2/3/11. (ntl)
February 3, 2011 106 Featured Case ORAL ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Oral Argument is scheduled for 2/28/2011 03:30 PM in Courtroom 6B re 87 motion to stay. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 2/3/11. (ntl)
February 1, 2011 105 REDACTED VERSION of 104 Notice to Take Deposition by Xerox Corporation. (Maguire, Lauren)
February 1, 2011 104 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Google Inc. and YouTube LLC on February 21, 2011 (Filed Under Seal) by Xerox Corporation.(Maguire, Lauren)
January 31, 2011 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Jeremy M. Brodsky,David J. Lisson for Right Media LLC,Jeremy M. Brodsky,David J. Lisson for Yahoo! Inc. added for electronic noticing. (dmp, )
January 31, 2011 103 Featured Case Order Setting Teleconference: the mediation scheduled with Judge Thynge for Tuesday, February 15, 2011 at 9:30 a.m. between plaintiff and defendants Yahoo and Right Media only and Wednesday, February 16, 2011 at 9:30 a.m. between plaintiff and defendants Google and YouTube only are cancelled. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a teleconference has been scheduled for Tuesday, February 15, 2011 at 11:00 a.m. with Judge Thynge to discuss the status of the case and court assisted ADR. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 1/31/2011. (cak)
January 25, 2011 102 REDACTED VERSION of 97 Reply Brief in Support of Defendants' Joint Motion for a Stay Pending Reexamination of the Patents-in-Suit by Google Inc., Right Media LLC, Yahoo! Inc., YouTube Inc., YouTube LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit [REDACTED] 17)(Tigan, Jeremy)
January 25, 2011 101 Featured Case ORAL ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that a Rule 16 scheduling teleconference has been scheduled for February 3, 2011 at 3:00 p.m. Plaintiff's counsel shall initiate the teleconference call to 302-573-4573. No further submissions are needed. Ordered by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/25/11. (ntl)
January 20, 2011 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 93 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David J. Lisson and Jeremy M. Brodsky filed by Right Media LLC, Yahoo! Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/20/11. (ntl)
January 20, 2011 100 REQUEST for Oral Argument by Xerox Corporation re 87 SEALED MOTION to Stay Pending Reexamination of the Patents-In-Suit. (Day, John)
January 19, 2011 99 PROPOSED ORDER (Proposed Scheduling Order) re 98 Letter by Xerox Corporation. (Hong, Caroline)
January 19, 2011 98 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Caroline Hong regarding proposed scheduling order. (Attachments: # 1 Scheduling Proposals Chart)(Hong, Caroline)
January 18, 2011 97 SEALED REPLY BRIEF re 87 SEALED MOTION to Stay Pending Reexamination of the Patents-In-Suit filed by Google Inc., Right Media LLC, Yahoo! Inc., YouTube Inc., YouTube LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 17)(Tigan, Jeremy)
January 14, 2011 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 96 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for parties to submit a proposed scheduling order to January 19, 2011 filed by Xerox Corporation. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/14/2011. (rpg)
January 13, 2011 96 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for parties to submit a proposed scheduling order to January 19, 2011 - filed by Xerox Corporation. (Day, John)
January 13, 2011 95 REDACTED VERSION of 91 Answering Brief in Opposition by Xerox Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-7, # 2 Exhibit 8, # 3 Exhibit 9 part 1, # 4 Exhibit 9 part 2, # 5 Exhibit 9 part 3, # 6 Exhibit 9 part 4)(Mayo, Andrew)
January 11, 2011 94 NOTICE of Withdrawal of pro hac vice counsel Jill Zimmerman and Jesse Dyer by Right Media LLC, Yahoo! Inc. re SO ORDERED (Tigan, Jeremy)
January 11, 2011 93 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David J. Lisson and Jeremy M. Brodsky - filed by Right Media LLC, Yahoo! Inc.. (Tigan, Jeremy)
January 7, 2011 92 Featured Case ORAL ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the parties shall confer regarding proposed dates in the scheduling order and shall submit their proposal to the Court no later than January 14, 2011. The parties are to review the Courts form scheduling order, which is posted at http://www.ded.uscourts.gov (see Chambers, Judge Stark, Forms). ORDERED by Judge Stark on 1/7/11.(ntl)
January 6, 2011 91 SEALED ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 87 SEALED MOTION to Stay Pending Reexamination of the Patents-In-Suit filed by Xerox Corporation.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 1/18/2011. (Mayo, Andrew)
December 27, 2010 90 REDACTED VERSION of 88 Opening Brief in Support, by Google Inc., Right Media LLC, Yahoo! Inc., YouTube Inc., YouTube LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-16)(Tigan, Jeremy)
December 27, 2010 89 REDACTED VERSION of 87 SEALED MOTION to Stay Pending Reexamination of the Patents-In-Suit by Google Inc., Right Media LLC, Yahoo! Inc., YouTube Inc., YouTube LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy)
December 17, 2010 88 SEALED OPENING BRIEF in Support re 87 SEALED MOTION to Stay Pending Reexamination of the Patents-In-Suit filed by Google Inc., Right Media LLC, Yahoo! Inc., YouTube Inc., YouTube LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 1/6/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1 through 16)(Tigan, Jeremy)
December 17, 2010 87 SEALED MOTION to Stay Pending Reexamination of the Patents-In-Suit - filed by Google Inc., Right Media Inc., Yahoo! Inc., YouTube Inc., YouTube LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy)
December 15, 2010 86 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Google Inc. and YouTube LLC on January 6, 2011 by Xerox Corporation.(Maguire, Lauren)
December 15, 2010 85 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Yahoo! Inc. and Right Media LLC on January 7, 2011 by Xerox Corporation.(Maguire, Lauren)
December 10, 2010 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Andrea P. Roberts for Google Inc. added for electronic noticing. (nms)
November 12, 2010 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 83 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Andrea Pallios Roberts of Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP filed by Google Inc., YouTube LLC, YouTube Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 11/12/2010. (rpg)
November 10, 2010 84 NOTICE of Issuance of Subpoena on IPVALUE Management Inc. by Google Inc., YouTube Inc., YouTube LLC (Moore, David)
November 2, 2010 83 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Andrea Pallios Roberts of Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP - filed by Google Inc., YouTube Inc., YouTube LLC. (Moore, David)
November 2, 2010 82 Featured Case ORAL ORDER: Paragraphs 8, 10, 11, 15, 17, and 20 of the Amended Scheduling Order (D.I. 60) are hereby VACATED. The dates in the scheduling order for 2011 and 2012 have been removed from the Courts calendar. The Court will hold a status conference in this case before the end of 2010. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 11/2/10. (ntl)
October 27, 2010 81 NOTICE of SUBPOENAS (Astoria Software, Inc.; EMC Corporation; and SAS Institute Inc.) by Yahoo! Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-3)(Tigan, Jeremy)
October 19, 2010 80 Featured Case ORAL ORDER: this case is no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Thynge. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/19/10. (ntl)
September 27, 2010 79 NOTICE of Issuance of Subpoenas upon 1) Amazon.com and 2) IMDB.com by Google Inc. (Moore, David) Modified on 9/29/2010 (nms).
September 23, 2010 78 Featured Case SO ORDERED re 77 Protective Order filed by Right Media Inc., Right Media LLC, Google Inc., YouTube LLC, Xerox Corporation, YouTube Inc., Yahoo! Inc. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 9/23/2010. (cak)
September 22, 2010 77 PROPOSED ORDER (Protective Order) by Google Inc., Right Media Inc., Right Media LLC, Xerox Corporation, Yahoo! Inc., YouTube Inc., YouTube LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment A (Confidential Agreement))(Maguire, Lauren)
September 8, 2010 76 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS ORDERED that: 1. Plaintiffs proposed language concerning paragraph 2(C) of the Agreed Protective Order (D.I. 67-1) is adopted; 2. On or before September 22, 2010, the parties shall submit a permanent protective order incorporating this language as well as the courts other decisions announced in the teleconference of August 19, 2010 (D.I. 73). Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 9/8/2010. (cak)
August 27, 2010 75 Letter to The Honorable Mary Pat Thynge from Jeremy A. Tigan regarding proposed reexamination bar (responding to 74 Letter). (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 8/30/2010 (nms).
August 24, 2010 74 Letter to The Honorable Mary Pat Thynge from Andrew C. Mayo regarding proposed reexamination bar. (Mayo, Andrew)
August 24, 2010 73 Official Transcript of Discovery Dispute held on 08-19-10 before Judge Mary Pat Thygne. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leonard A. Dibbs. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/14/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/24/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/22/2010. (lad)
August 19, 2010 72 Featured Case ORDER On 8/19/2010, the court held a teleconference with counsel to address discovery issues. IT IS ORDERED that the transcript of the teleconference of 8/19/2010 shall serve as the Order of the court in this matter. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 8/19/2010. (cak)
August 19, 2010 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mary Pat Thynge - Telephone Conference held on 8/19/2010. (Court Reporter Leonard Dibbs.) (nms)
August 18, 2010 71 Letter to The Honorable Mary Pat Thynge from Richard L. Horwitz regarding responsive discovery dispute letter - re 68 Letter. (Horwitz, Richard)
August 18, 2010 70 Letter to The Honorable Mary Pat Thynge from Lauren E. Maguire regarding response to Defendants' discovery dispute letter - re 69 Letter. (Maguire, Lauren)
August 18, 2010 Case reassigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (maw)
August 17, 2010 69 Letter to The Honorable Mary Pat Thynge from Richard L. Horwitz, Esquire regarding discovery disputes - re 64 Order Setting Teleconference. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Horwitz, Richard)
August 17, 2010 68 Letter to The Honorable Mary Pat Thynge from Lauren E. Maguire regarding discovery disputes for August 19, 2010 teleconference. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-D)(Maguire, Lauren)
August 10, 2010 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 67 Stipulation and Interim Protective Order. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 8/10/10. (ntl)
August 3, 2010 67 PROPOSED ORDER Interim Protective Order by Google Inc., Right Media Inc., Right Media LLC, Xerox Corporation, Yahoo! Inc., YouTube Inc., YouTube LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Day, John)
July 28, 2010 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 66 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Brian C. Howard filed by Google Inc., YouTube LLC, YouTube Inc. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 7/28/10. (ntl)
July 27, 2010 66 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Brian C. Howard - filed by Google Inc., YouTube Inc., YouTube LLC. Motions referred to Mary Pat Thynge.(Moore, David)
July 21, 2010 65 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Yahoo! Inc. and Right Media LLC's Supplemental Responses to Request Nos. 5-7 of Xerox's First Set of Requests for Production of Documents by Right Media LLC, Yahoo! Inc..(Tigan, Jeremy)
July 14, 2010 64 Order Setting Teleconference: Telephone Conference set for 8/19/2010 at 11:00 AM before Judge Mary Pat Thynge to address discovery issues. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 7/14/2010. (cak)
July 12, 2010 63 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Yahoo! Inc. and Right Media LLC's Supplemental Responses to Interrogatory Nos. 7 through 9 of Xerox's First Set of Interrogatories by Right Media LLC, Yahoo! Inc..(Tigan, Jeremy)
June 25, 2010 62 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Google and YouTube LLC's Objections and Responses to Plaintiff Xerox Corporation's Second Set of Requests for Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 30-31) by Google Inc., YouTube LLC.(Moore, David)
June 25, 2010 61 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Yahoo! Inc. and Right Media LLC's Responses and Objections to Xerox's Second Set of Requests for Production of Documents by Right Media LLC, Yahoo! Inc..(Tigan, Jeremy)
June 17, 2010 60 Amended Scheduling Order: 10-day Jury Trial (tentatively) set for 10/1/2012 09:30 AM. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 6/17/10. (ntl)
June 17, 2010 59 NOTICE OF SERVICE of First Supplemental Initial Disclosures of Google Inc. and YouTube LLC Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(A)(1) by Google Inc., YouTube LLC.(Moore, David)
June 15, 2010 58 PROPOSED ORDER (Amended Scheduling Order) by Xerox Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Letter to Judge Thynge enclosing amended scheduling order)(Day, John)
June 15, 2010 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mary Pat Thynge - Telephone Conference held on 6/15/2010. (Court Reporter: Heather Triozzi - Hawkins Rptg.) (ntl)
June 8, 2010 57 Order Setting Teleconference: Telephone Conference set for 6/15/2010 at 10:00 AM before Judge Mary Pat Thynge. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 6/8/2010. (cak)
June 4, 2010 56 Letter to The Honorable Mary Pat Thynge from Richard L. Horwitz, Esquire regarding trial dates. (Horwitz, Richard)
May 27, 2010 55 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Responses and Objections to Yahoo Inc.'s and Right Media LLC's First Set of Interrogatories by Xerox Corporation.(Maguire, Lauren)
May 27, 2010 54 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Responses and Objections to Google Inc.'s and YouTube LLC's First Set of Interrogatories by Xerox Corporation.(Maguire, Lauren)
May 27, 2010 53 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Responses and Objections to Defendants Yahoo! Inc.'s and Right Media LLC's First Set of Requests for Production by Xerox Corporation.(Maguire, Lauren)
May 27, 2010 52 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Responses and Objections to Defendants' First Set of Requests for Production of Documents by Xerox Corporation.(Maguire, Lauren)
May 27, 2010 51 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Responses and Objections to Defendants' First Set of Interrogatories by Xerox Corporation.(Maguire, Lauren)
May 27, 2010 50 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) Responses and Objections to Xerox's First Set of Requests for Production of Documents; and 2) Responses and Objections to Xerox's First Set of Interrogatories by Right Media Inc., Yahoo! Inc..(Tigan, Jeremy)
May 27, 2010 49 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Google Inc. and YouTube LLC's First Objections and Responses to Xerox's First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-9) and First Set of Requests for Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 1-8, 22-29) by Google Inc., YouTube LLC.(Moore, David)
May 25, 2010 48 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Xerox's Initial Disclosures by Xerox Corporation.(Day, John)
May 25, 2010 47 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Yahoo! Inc.'s and Right Media LLC's Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) by Right Media Inc., Yahoo! Inc..(Tigan, Jeremy)
May 25, 2010 46 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures of Google Inc. and YouTube LLC Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) by Google Inc., YouTube LLC.(Moore, David)
May 21, 2010 45 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Xerox's Second Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things by Xerox Corporation.(Day, John)
May 17, 2010 44 Featured Case ORDER Setting Mediation Conferences: Mediation conferences are scheduled with Judge Thynge as follows: Tuesday, February 15, 2011 beginning at 9:30 a.m. between plaintiff and defendants Yahoo and Right Media only. Wednesday, February 16, 2011 beginning at 9:30 a.m. between plaintiff and defendants Google and YouTube only. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 5/17/2010. (cak)
May 11, 2010 43 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties due by 12/17/2010. Amended Pleadings due by 12/17/2010. Discovery due by 8/12/2011. Status Teleconference set for 3/8/2011 11:00 AM before Judge Mary Pat Thynge. Status Report due by 3/1/2011. Tutorial on the technology due by 5/20/2011. Dispositive Motions due by 2/3/2012. Claims Construction Opening Brief due by 4/4/2011. Markman Hearing set for 5/20/2011 09:00 AM. Pretrial Conference set for 8/13/2012 09:00 AM. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 8/6/2012. 10-day Jury Trial (tentatively) set for 9/17/2012 09:30 AM. (2nd) Status Teleconference set for 6/21/2011 11:00 AM before Judge Mary Pat Thynge. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 5/11/10. (ntl)
May 10, 2010 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 41 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Eugene Novikov filed by Google Inc., YouTube LLC, Yahoo! Inc. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 5/10/10. (ntl)
May 7, 2010 CASE REFERRED to Judge Thynge for Mediation. (cak)
May 7, 2010 42 Order Setting Teleconference: Telephone Conference set for 5/13/2010 at 10:00 AM before Judge Mary Pat Thynge to discuss mediation. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 5/7/2010. (cak)
May 5, 2010 41 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Eugene Novikov - filed by Google Inc., Yahoo! Inc., YouTube LLC. Motions referred to Mary Pat Thynge.(Moore, David)
May 4, 2010 40 ANSWER to 24 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Xerox Corporation.(Maguire, Lauren)
May 4, 2010 39 ANSWER to 27 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Xerox Corporation.(Maguire, Lauren)
May 4, 2010 38 ANSWER to 30 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Xerox Corporation.(Maguire, Lauren)
May 3, 2010 37 PROPOSED ORDER (Proposed Scheduling Order) by Google Inc., Right Media Inc., Right Media LLC, Xerox Corporation, Yahoo! Inc., YouTube Inc., YouTube LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Letter to Judge Thynge regarding Proposed Scheduling Order)(Day, John)
April 26, 2010 36 NOTICE OF SERVICE of First Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things by Xerox Corporation.(Day, John)
April 26, 2010 35 NOTICE OF SERVICE of First Set of Interrogatories by Xerox Corporation.(Day, John)
April 26, 2010 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mary Pat Thynge - Telephone Conference held on 4/26/2010. (Court Reporter: Heather Triozzi - Hawkins Rptg.) (ntl)
April 26, 2010 34 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Google Inc. and YouTube LLCs' 1st set of Interogs and Defendants' 1) 1st Set of Interogs and 2) 1st Set of Request for Production of Docs by Google Inc., Right Media Inc., Yahoo! Inc., YouTube Inc., YouTube LLC.(Moore, David)
April 23, 2010 33 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (i) Defendants Yahoo! Inc.'s and Right Media LLC's First Set of Interrogatories to Xerox Corporation; and (ii) Defendants Yahoo! Inc.'s and Right Media LLC's First Set of Requests for Production to Xerox Corporation by Right Media LLC, Yahoo! Inc..(Tigan, Jeremy)
April 23, 2010 32 PROPOSED Scheduling ORDER re 29 Order Setting Teleconference by Google Inc., Right Media Inc., Right Media LLC, Xerox Corporation, Yahoo! Inc., YouTube Inc., YouTube LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Letter to Judge Thynge, # 2 Chart of the parties' scheduling order proposals)(Day, John) Modified on 4/26/2010 (nms).
April 19, 2010 31 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Right Media LLC. (Noreika, Maryellen)
April 19, 2010 30 ANSWER to 19 Amended Complaint, and COUNTERCLAIMS against Xerox Corporation by Right Media LLC.(Noreika, Maryellen) Modified on 4/20/2010 (nms).
April 8, 2010 22 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jesse Dyer and Jill Zimmerman - filed by Yahoo! Inc.. Motions referred to Mary Pat Thynge.(Noreika, Maryellen)
March 29, 2010 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Xerox Corporation. Right Media LLC served on 3/29/2010, answer due 4/19/2010. (Day, John)
March 29, 2010 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Xerox Corporation. Right Media Inc. served on 3/29/2010, answer due 4/19/2010. (Day, John)
March 29, 2010 Summons Issued as to Right Media Inc. on 3/29/2010; Right Media LLC on 3/29/2010. (els)
March 29, 2010 19 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Google Inc., Yahoo! Inc., YouTube Inc., YouTube LLC, Right Media Inc., Right Media LLC- filed by Xerox Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Day, John)
March 18, 2010 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 16 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Anthony I. Fenwick filed by Yahoo! Inc. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 3/18/10. (ntl)
March 16, 2010 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 15 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David A. Perlson and Charles K. Verhoeven of Quinn Emanuel Urquhart Oliver & Hedges, LLP filed by Google Inc., YouTube LLC, YouTube Inc. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 3/16/10. (ntl)
March 12, 2010 18 NOTICE of Change of Firm Name by Google Inc., YouTube Inc., YouTube LLC Notice of Change of Firm Name from Quinn Emanuel Urquhart Oliver & Hedges, LLP to Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan LLP (Moore, David)
March 12, 2010 17 NOTICE of APPEARANCE (Matthew B. Lehr and Anthony I. Fenwick of David Polk & Wardwell LLP) by Yahoo! Inc. (Noreika, Maryellen)
March 12, 2010 16 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Anthony I. Fenwick - filed by Yahoo! Inc.. Motions referred to Mary Pat Thynge.(Noreika, Maryellen)
March 10, 2010 15 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David A. Perlson and Charles K. Verhoeven of Quinn Emanuel Urquhart Oliver & Hedges, LLP - filed by Google Inc., YouTube Inc., YouTube LLC. Motions referred to Mary Pat Thynge.(Moore, David)
March 5, 2010 14 Featured Case ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Mary Pat Thynge. Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 3/5/2010. (nms)
March 4, 2010 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 12 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to April 15, 2010 filed by Google Inc., YouTube LLC, YouTube Inc. (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Google Inc. answer due 4/15/2010; YouTube Inc. answer due 4/15/2010; YouTube LLC answer due 4/15/2010). Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 3/4/2010. (nms)
March 4, 2010 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 13 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint to April 15, 2010 filed by Xerox Corporation, Yahoo! Inc. (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Yahoo! Inc. answer due 4/15/2010). Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 3/4/2010. (nms)
March 4, 2010 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Richard J. Stark, Andrei Harasymiak, Peter A. Emmi, Scott A. Leslie, Allison M. Snyder filed by Xerox Corporation. Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 3/4/2010. (nms)
March 3, 2010 13 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint to April 15, 2010 - filed by Xerox Corporation, Yahoo! Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
March 3, 2010 Case assigned to Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. Please include the initials of the Judge (JJF) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
February 25, 2010 12 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to April 15, 2010 - filed by Google Inc., YouTube Inc., YouTube LLC. (Moore, David)
February 25, 2010 11 NOTICE of Appearance by David Ellis Moore on behalf of Google Inc., YouTube Inc., YouTube LLC (Moore, David)
February 25, 2010 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard L. Horwitz on behalf of Google Inc., YouTube Inc., YouTube LLC (Horwitz, Richard)
February 22, 2010 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Xerox Corporation. YouTube LLC served on 2/22/2010, answer due 3/15/2010. (Day, John)
February 22, 2010 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Xerox Corporation. Yahoo! Inc. served on 2/22/2010, answer due 3/15/2010. (Day, John)
February 22, 2010 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Xerox Corporation. Google Inc. served on 2/22/2010, answer due 3/15/2010. (Day, John)
February 22, 2010 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Xerox Corporation. YouTube Inc. served on 2/22/2010, answer due 3/15/2010. (Day, John)
February 22, 2010 Summons Reissued as to Google Inc., Yahoo! Inc., YouTube LLC. (els)
February 22, 2010 Alias Summons Issued as to YouTube Inc. on 2/22/2010. (rwc)
February 22, 2010 CORRECTING ENTRY: Per request of counsel for plaintiff, exhibit A to D.I. 1 (complaint) has been deleted and replaced with the proper version. (fms)
February 19, 2010 5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Richard J. Stark, Andrei Harasymiak, Peter A. Emmi, Scott A. Leslie, Allison M. Snyder - filed by Xerox Corporation. (ksr)
February 19, 2010 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Xerox Corporation. (ksr)
February 19, 2010 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 6,778,979 B2; US 6,236,994 B1; (ksr)
February 19, 2010 Summons Issued as to Google Inc. on 2/19/2010; Yahoo! Inc. on 2/19/2010; YouTube Inc. on 2/19/2010; YouTube LLC on 2/19/2010. (ksr)
February 19, 2010 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction (ksr)
February 19, 2010 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Google Inc., Yahoo! Inc., YouTube Inc., YouTube LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 095477.) - filed by Xerox Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Acknowledgement of Consent Form, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(ksr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/22/2010: # 5 Exhibit A) (fms).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Xerox Corporation v. Google Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xerox Corporation
Represented By: John G. Day
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yahoo! Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YouTube Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YouTube LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?