Ironworks Patents LLC v. Apple Inc. Featured Case
Plaintiff: MobileMedia Ideas LLC and Ironworks Patents LLC
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Case Number: 1:2010cv00258
Filed: March 31, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
Presiding Judge: Sue L Robinson
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 769 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT of the following sealed documents, signed on behalf of Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP : D.I. # 240, 241, 242, 274, 275, 298, 299, 304, 332, 333, 334, 335, 336, 339, 355,356,357,358, 363, 364, 365, 366, 367, 368, 402, 407, 408, 415, 467(myr)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 768 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT of the following sealed documents, signed on behalf of Farnan LLP : D.I. # 352, 353, 354 (myr)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 767 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT of the following sealed documents, signed on behalf of Morris James LLP : D.I. # 227,228, 270,271, 292, 293, 306, 307, 323, 324,327, 331, 337,361,375,376,378,379, 411,412,423, 424, 428,437 (myr)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 766 Letter to Jeremy A. Tigan and Rodger Dallery Smith, II from Clerk, dated 8/20/2019, regarding request for counsel to contact Clerk's Office or send runner to pick-up sealed documents. (myr)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 765 Letter to Richard K. Herrmann and Mary Matterer from Clerk, dated 8/20/2019, regarding request for counsel to contact Clerk's Office or send runner to pick-up sealed documents. (myr)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 764 Letter to Brian Farnan from Clerk, dated 8/20/2019, regarding request for counsel to contact Clerk's Office or send runner to pick-up sealed documents. (myr)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 763 ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING RETURN OF SEALED DOCUMENTS: Pursuant to the attached STANDING ORDER dated January 8, 2013, sealed documents identified on the attached letter(s) will be claimed by the FILING party/attorney no later than 9/3/2019. Filing attorney or their designee shall CLAIM their sealed documents by contacting the Clerk's Office at 302-573-6170 and/or by sending a courier to claim and receipt for the sealed documents. Documents not claimed shall be unsealed and handled pursuant to the standing order. Signed by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 1/8/2013. (myr)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 762 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT of Trial Exhibits by Ironworks Patents LLC. (nmf)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Defendant's trial exhibits destroyed per counsel. (nmf)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 761 MANDATE of USCA as to #752 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit),, filed by Apple Inc., #754 Notice of Cross Appeal filed by Ironworks Patents LLC. USCA Decision: DISMISSED under Fed. R. App. P. 42 (b). (fms)
October 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 760 NOTICE of Screening Procedure by Ironworks Patents, LLC (Farnan, Michael)
August 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 759 Redaction of #758 Transcript. (vjg)
August 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 758 [SEALED] Transcript of jury trial held on September 21, 2016 before Judge Robinson.. (vjg)
August 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 757 Official Transcript of jury trial held on September 20, 2016 before Judge Robinson. Court Reporter/Transcriber Valerie Gunning,Telephone number (302) 573-6194. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/5/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/14/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/13/2017. (vjg)
July 26, 2017 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: Per request of filer, the transcript purchase order at D.I. #756 has been removed and replaced with the corrected version. (fms)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 756 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Apple Inc. for proceedings held on 8/3/2016, 9/13/2016, 9/20/2016, 9/21/2016 before Judge Robinson, (Matterer, Mary) (Main Document 756 replaced on 7/26/2017) (fms).
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 755 NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA for the Federal Circuit re #754 Notice of Cross Appeal filed by Ironworks Patents LLC. USCA Case Number 17-2341 (fms)
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 754 NOTICE OF CROSS APPEAL to the Federal Circuit of #749 Judgment . Cross Appeal filed by Ironworks Patents LLC. (Farnan, Michael)
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order APPEAL - Credit Card Payment of $505.00 received re #754 Notice of Cross Appeal filed by Ironworks Patents LLC. ( Filing fee $505, receipt number 0311-2187372.) (Farnan, Michael)
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Notification regarding #754 Notice of Cross Appeal sent to Reporter Dibbs (nmg)
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit re #754 Notice of Cross Appeal. (nmg)
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Notification regarding #754 Notice of Cross Appeal sent to Reporter Gunning (nmg)
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 753 NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA for the Federal Circuit re #752 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit) filed by Apple Inc.. USCA Case Number 17-2291 (fms)
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 752 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Federal Circuit of #749 Judgment, #461 Memorandum Opinion, #675 Memorandum Opinion, #612 Order, #571 Order,,, Set Deadlines,,, Order Setting Scheduling Conference,, #746 Order on Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law,,, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,,,, #676 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,,,, #689 Order, #462 Order on Motion to Strike,,,,,, Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment,, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,,,, #745 Memorandum Opinion, #631 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, #630 Memorandum Opinion, #709 Judgment . Appeal filed by Apple Inc.. (Matterer, Mary)
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order APPEAL - Credit Card Payment of $505.00 received re #752 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit),, filed by Apple Inc.. ( Filing fee $505, receipt number 0311-2180144.) (Matterer, Mary)
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Notification regarding #752 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit),, sent to Reporter Dibbs (nmg)
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit re #752 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit). (nmg)
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Notification regarding #752 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit),, sent to Reporter Gunning (nmg)
June 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 751 REDACTED VERSION of #747 Letter, by Ironworks Patents LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Farnan, Michael)
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 750 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,253,075 B1; 6,427,078 B1; RE39,231 E; 5,737,394; 6,002,390; 6,070,068; 6,393,430 B1; 6,441,828 B1; 6,446,080 B1; 6,549,942 B1; 6,760,477 B2; 7,313,647 B2; 7,349,012 B2; 5,915,239. (Attachments: #1 Judgment)(nmfn)
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 749 FINAL JUDGMENT FOLLOWING POST TRIAL MOTION PRACTICE PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 54(b) in favor of Ironworks Patents LLC against Apple Inc. in the amount of $10,723,926.00 (CASE CLOSED). Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 6/15/2017. (nmfn)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 748 REDACTED MEMORANDUM OPINION re: #745 SEALED MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 6/12/2017. (nmfn)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order The Court's 6/12/2017 Memorandum Opinion (D.I. #745 ) has been placed under seal per letter from counsel (D.I. #747 ). (nmfn)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 747 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Michael J. Farnan regarding Proposed Redactions to the Court's June 12, 2017 Memorandum Opinion - re #745 Memorandum Opinion. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Farnan, Michael)
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 746 ORDER - 1. Plaintiff's motion for judgment as a matter of law (D.I. #712 ) is granted-in-part, to wit: a. Defendant shall pay damages in the amount of $8,940,625; and b. Plaintiff's motion for a new trial is denied; 2. Plaintiff's motion for award of prejudgment and postjudgment interest (D.I. #713 ) is granted, to wit: a. Defendant shall pay prejudgment interest in the amount of $1,736.372; and b. Defendant shall pay postjudgment interest in the amount of $46,929; 3. Defendant's motion for post-trial relief and judgment as a matter of law (D.I. #714 ) is denied. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 6/12/2017. (fms)
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 745 [SEALED] MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 6/12/2017. (fms) Modified on 6/14/2017 (nmfn).
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 744 Redaction of #740 Transcript of the Jury Trial held on 9/19/16 before Judge Robinson. (fms)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 743 Redaction of #738 Transcript of the Jury Trial held on 9/14/16 before Judge Robinson. (fms)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 742 Redaction of #737 Transcript of the Jury Trial held on 9/13/16 before Judge Robinson. (fms)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 741 Redaction of #736 Transcript of the Jury Trial held on 9/12/16 before Judge Robinson. (fms)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 740 [SEALED] Transcript of Jury Trial held on 9/19/2016 before Judge Robinson.. (fms)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 739 Official Transcript of Jury Trial held on 9/15/2016 before Judge Robinson. Court Reporter/Transcriber V. Gunning,Telephone number 302-573-6194. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/9/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/19/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/17/2017. (fms)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 738 [SEALED] Transcript of Jury Trial held on 9/14/2016 before Judge Robinson. (fms)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 737 [SEALED] Transcript of Jury Trial held on 9/13/2016 before Judge Robinson. (fms)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 736 [SEALED] Transcript of Jury Trial held on 9/12/2016 before Judge Robinson. (fms)
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney David Berten and Alison A. Richards for Ironworks Patents LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (lmm)
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #735 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David Berten and Alison Aubry Richards filed by Ironworks Patents LLC. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 4/20/2017. (fms)
April 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 735 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David Berten and Alison Aubry Richards - filed by Ironworks Patents LLC. (Farnan, Brian)
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order The docket text of D.I. #734 has been modified per request of filer to reflect the fact that the motion is unopposed. (nmfn)
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #734 MOTION to Substitute Party and Counsel. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 4/18/2017. (fms)
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 734 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Party: Ironworks Patents LLC to replace MobileMedia Ideas, LLC, MOTION to Substitute Attorney: Brian E. Farnan and Michael J. Farnan of Farnan LLP to be substituted for Jack B. Blumenfeld, Jeremy A. Tigan, and Rodger Dallery Smith, II from Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP and Anthony C. Coles, Kenneth Rubenstein, Kimberly A. Mottley, Laura E. Stafford, Safraz W. Ishmael, Steven M. Bauer and William D. Dalsen of Proskauer - filed by Ironworks Patents LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Farnan, Michael) Modified on 4/18/2017 (nmfn).
December 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 733 REDACTED VERSION of #730 Reply Brief by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy)
December 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 732 REDACTED VERSION of #729 Reply Brief by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy)
December 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 731 REPLY BRIEF re #714 MOTION for Post-Trial Relief re #701 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Pursuant to Rule 50(a), #702 Declaration filed by Apple Inc.. (Matterer, Mary)
December 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 730 [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re #713 MOTION for an Award of Prejudgment and Postjudgment Interest filed by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy)
December 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 729 [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re #712 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law or in the Alternative for a New Trial with Respect to Damages filed by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy)
December 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 728 REDACTED VERSION of #723 Answering Brief in Opposition, to Plaintiff's Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law and Motion for New Trial on Damages by Apple Inc.. (Matterer, Mary)
December 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 727 REDACTED VERSION of #722 Declaration executed by Luann L. Simmons by Apple Inc.. (Matterer, Mary)
December 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 726 REDACTED VERSION of #721 Answering Brief in Opposition to Motion for an Award of Prejudgment and Postjudgment Interest by Apple Inc.. (Matterer, Mary)
December 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 725 REDACTED VERSION of #724 Memorandum in Opposition, by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy)
December 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 724 [SEALED] MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #714 -- Plaintiff MobileMedia Ideas LLC's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Apple's Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law and/or Motion for New Trial Pursuant to Rules 50(b) and 59 -- filed by MobileMedia Ideas LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 12/12/2016. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 12/5/2016 (fms).
December 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 723 [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #712 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law or in the Alternative for a New Trial with Respect to Damages filed by Apple Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 12/12/2016. (Matterer, Mary)
December 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 722 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #721 Answering Brief in Opposition -- executed by Luann L. Simmons -- by Apple Inc.. (Matterer, Mary)
December 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 721 [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #713 MOTION for an Award of Prejudgment and Postjudgment Interest filed by Apple Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 12/12/2016. (Matterer, Mary)
November 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 720 REDACTED VERSION of #716 Opening Brief in Support, by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy)
November 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 719 REDACTED VERSION of #715 Opening Brief in Support by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy)
November 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 718 REDACTED VERSION of #717 Opening Brief in Support, Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law and/or Motion for New Trial pursuant to Rules 50(b) and 59 by Apple Inc.. (Matterer, Mary)
October 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 717 [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re #714 MOTION for Post-Trial Relief re #701 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Pursuant to Rule 50(a), #702 Declaration filed by Apple Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 11/17/2016. (Matterer, Mary)
October 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 716 [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re #712 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law or in the Alternative for a New Trial with Respect to Damages filed by MobileMedia Ideas LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 11/17/2016. (Tigan, Jeremy)
October 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 715 [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re #713 MOTION for an Award of Prejudgment and Postjudgment Interest filed by MobileMedia Ideas LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 11/17/2016. (Tigan, Jeremy)
October 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 714 MOTION for Post-Trial Relief re #701 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Pursuant to Rule 50(a), #702 Declaration - filed by Apple Inc.. (Matterer, Mary)
October 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 713 MOTION for an Award of Prejudgment and Postjudgment Interest - filed by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy)
October 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 712 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law or in the Alternative for a New Trial with Respect to Damages - filed by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy)
October 7, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #711 Stipulation Setting Post-Trial Briefing Schedule filed by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. Opening Briefs - October 31, 2016, Answering Briefs - December 2, 2016, Reply Briefs - December 22, 2016. See Stipulation for further details. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 10/7/2016. (fms)
October 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 711 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Setting Post-Trial Briefing Schedule by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy)
September 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 710 REDACTED VERSION of #702 Declaration of Luann L. Simmons in support of Apple Inc.'s Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law by Apple Inc.. (Matterer, Mary)
September 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 709 JUDGMENT FOLLOWING A JURY VERDICT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 58(b) in favor of MobileMedia Ideas LLC against Apple Inc. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 9/22/2016. (nmfn)
September 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 708 Exhibit List for the Jury Trial held 9/12/2016-9/15/2016, 9/19/2016-9/21/2016. (Attachments: #1 joint exhibit list, #2 plaintiff's exhibit list, #3 defendant's exhibit list)(fms)
September 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 707 [SEALED] Jury Notes. (fms)
September 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 706 [SEALED] Jury List. (fms)
September 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 705 REDACTED VERSION of #704 Jury Verdict. (fms)
September 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 704 [SEALED] JURY VERDICT. (fms)
September 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sue L. Robinson - Jury Trial completed on 9/21/2016 (DAY 7); Jury Deliberations and Verdict. (Court Reporter V. Gunning.) (fms)
September 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 703 Final Jury Instructions (Read in open court by Judge Robinson on 9/20/2016). (fms)
September 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sue L. Robinson - Jury Trial held on 9/20/2016 (DAY 6). Jury Instructions and deliberations. (Court Reporter V. Gunning.) (fms)
September 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 702 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #701 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Pursuant to Rule 50(a) as executed by Luann L. Simmons by Apple Inc.. (Matterer, Mary)
September 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 701 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Pursuant to Rule 50(a) - filed by Apple Inc.. (Matterer, Mary)
September 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 700 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law - filed by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy)
September 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sue L. Robinson - Jury Trial held on 9/19/2016 (DAY 5). (Court Reporter V. Gunning.) (fms)
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order The charge conference will be held on Monday, September 19, 2016 at 8:15 a.m. (nmfn)
September 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sue L. Robinson - Jury Trial held on 9/15/2016 (DAY 4). (Court Reporter V. Gunning.) (fms)
September 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 699 Proposed Jury Instructions by MobileMedia Ideas LLC . (Tigan, Jeremy)
September 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 698 VERDICT SHEET by MobileMedia Ideas LLC . (Tigan, Jeremy)
September 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sue L. Robinson - Jury Trial held on 9/14/2016 (DAY 3). (Court Reporter V. Gunning.) (fms)
September 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sue L. Robinson - Jury Trial held on 9/13/2016 (DAY 2). (Court Reporter V. Gunning.) (fms)
September 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 697 Preliminary Jury Instructions (Read in open court by Judge Robinson on 9/12/16).(fms)
September 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 696 Voir Dire Questions (Read in open court by Judge Robinson on 9/12/16). (fms) (Main Document 696 replaced on 9/12/2016) (fms).
September 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sue L. Robinson - Jury Trial held on 9/12/2016 (DAY 1). (Court Reporter V. Gunning.) (fms)
September 12, 2016 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: D.I. #696 has been removed and replaced with a corrected version that includes lists. (fms)
September 9, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #695 STIPULATION Regarding Pretrial Order filed by Apple Inc. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 9/9/2016. (nmfn)
September 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 695 STIPULATION Regarding Pretrial Order by Apple Inc.. (Matterer, Mary)
September 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 694 Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Jeremy A. Tigan regarding identification of issues remaining for trial and enclosing [Proposed] Revised Preliminary Jury Instructions. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Revised Preliminary Jury Instructions)(Tigan, Jeremy)
September 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 693 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Apple Inc.'s Final Trial Exhibit List and MobileMedia Ideas LLC's Objections to Apple's Trial Exhibit List and Apple Inc.'s Trial Witness List filed by Apple Inc..(Matterer, Mary)
September 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 692 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) MobileMedia Ideas LLC's Final List of Trial Witnesses and (2) MobileMedia Ideas LLC's List of Exhibits it May Offer at Trial filed by MobileMedia Ideas LLC.(Tigan, Jeremy)
September 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 691 Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Mary B. Matterer regarding parties' submission of their positions as to Apple's Open Matter No. 5 - re #689 Order. (Matterer, Mary)
September 2, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #690 Joint STIPULATION Regarding Non-Infringement of the '155 Patent filed by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 9/2/2016. (nmfn)
August 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 690 Joint STIPULATION Regarding Non-Infringement of the '155 Patent by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy)
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 689 ORDER re: proposed pretrial order and "open matters." Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 8/22/2016. (nmfn)
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 688 Redaction of #687 Transcript. (vjg)
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 687 [SEALED] Transcript of pretrial conference held on August 3, 3016 before Judge Robinson.. (vjg)
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Set Transcript Deadlines re #688 Redacted Transcript. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/21/2016. (fms)
August 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 686 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Apple Inc.'s Notice of Disclosure of Prior Art pursuant to 35 U.S.C. 282 filed by Apple Inc..(Herrmann, Richard)
August 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 685 Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Mary B. Matterer regarding Enclosing Transcript. (Matterer, Mary)
August 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 684 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney James Anderson - filed by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy)
August 4, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #684 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney James Anderson filed by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 8/4/2016. (fms)
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #677 Proposed Pretrial Order filed by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 8/3/2016. (nmfn)
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sue L. Robinson - Final Pretrial Conference held on 8/3/2016. (Court Reporter V. Gunning.) (nmfn)
August 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 683 Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Mary B. Matterer regarding Federal Circuit decision pertaining to the term "symbol generator". (Matterer, Mary)
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 682 VERDICT SHEET by Apple Inc. . (Matterer, Mary)
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 681 VERDICT SHEET by MobileMedia Ideas LLC . (Tigan, Jeremy)
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 680 Proposed Voir Dire by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy)
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 679 Proposed Jury Instructions by MobileMedia Ideas LLC (Final). (Tigan, Jeremy)
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 678 Proposed Jury Instructions by MobileMedia Ideas LLC (Preliminary). (Tigan, Jeremy)
July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 677 Proposed Pretrial Order by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-14)(Tigan, Jeremy)
July 25, 2016 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: The pdf of D.I. #676 has been replaced with the correct pdf and the text has also been modified to reflect that Apple's motion for summary judgment on damages is denied. (nmfn)
July 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 676 ORDER denying #633 Motion for Summary Judgment ; denying #636 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Gareth Loy, DMA, Regarding U.S. Patent No. 6,725,155 ; denying #639 MOTION to Exclude MMI's Expert John C. Jarosz's Opinions Based on Apple Patents Asserted in Apple v Samsung. Apple's request to exclude the survey question is denied. MobileMedia's request to exclude the opinion regarding non-infringing alternatives is denied. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 7/21/2016. (nmfn) Modified on 7/25/2016 (nmfn). (Main Document 676 replaced on 7/25/2016) (nmfn, ).
July 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 675 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 7/21/2016. (nmfn)
June 29, 2016 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: Per request of filer D.I. Nos. 671 and 672 have been removed and replaced with corrected versions. (fms)
June 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sue L. Robinson - Oral Argument held on 6/28/2016. (Court Reporter V. Gunning.) (nmfn)
June 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 674 REDACTED VERSION of #672 Declaration executed by Luann L. Simmons by Apple Inc.. (Matterer, Mary)
June 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 673 REDACTED VERSION of #671 Reply Brief in support of Apple Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment on Damages by Apple Inc.. (Matterer, Mary)
June 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 672 [SEALED] Supplemental DECLARATION re #671 Reply Brief in support of Motion for Smmary Judgment on Damages, executed by Luann L. Simmons by Apple Inc.. (Matterer, Mary) (Main Document 672 replaced on 6/29/2016) (fms).
June 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 671 [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re #633 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Damages filed by Apple Inc.. (Matterer, Mary) (Main Document 671 replaced on 6/29/2016) (fms).
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 670 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Apple Inc.'s Rebuttal Trial Witness List filed by Apple Inc..(Matterer, Mary)
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 669 NOTICE OF SERVICE of MobileMedia Ideas LLC's Rebuttal Fact Witness List for Trial filed by MobileMedia Ideas LLC.(Tigan, Jeremy)
May 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 668 REDACTED VERSION of #660 Declaration by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-8)(Tigan, Jeremy)
May 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 667 REDACTED VERSION of #659 Letter, by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy)
May 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 666 REDACTED VERSION of #658 Declaration by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D, #2 Exhibit E-J)(Tigan, Jeremy)
May 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 665 REDACTED VERSION of #657 Answering Brief in Opposition by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy)
May 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 664 REDACTED VERSION of #654 Letter, by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1 -2)(Tigan, Jeremy)
May 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 663 REDACTED VERSION of #653 Declaration, by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy)
May 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 662 REDACTED VERSION of #652 Letter, by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy)
May 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 661 REDACTED VERSION of #656 Declaration of Melody Drummond Hansen in Support of Apple's Opposition to MobileMedia's Request to Exclude Opinions Discussing Possible Non-Infringing Alternatives by Apple Inc.. (Matterer, Mary)
May 24, 2016 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: The pdfs of the attachments to D.I. #653 and #654 have been replaced with corrected versions per request of filer. (nmfn)
May 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 660 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #659 Letter, -- Declaration of Laura E. Stafford -- by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1 - 5, #2 Exhibits 6-8)(Tigan, Jeremy)
May 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 659 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Jeremy A. Tigan regarding Apple's Daubert Motion to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Dr. Gareth Loy - re #636 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Gareth Loy, DMA, Regarding U.S. Patent No. 6,725,155 . (Tigan, Jeremy)
May 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 658 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #657 Answering Brief in Opposition -- Declaration of Laura E. Stafford -- by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-D, #2 Exhibits E-J)(Tigan, Jeremy)
May 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 657 [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #633 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Damages filed by MobileMedia Ideas LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 6/3/2016. (Tigan, Jeremy)
May 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 656 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #655 Statement -- Declaration of Melody Drummond Hansen in support by Apple Inc.. (Herrmann, Richard)
May 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 655 STATEMENT re #632 Letter -- Apple's Opposition to MobileMedia's Request to Exclude Opinions Discussing Possible Non-Infringing Alternatives by Apple Inc.. (Herrmann, Richard)
May 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 654 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Jeremy A. Tigan regarding Apple's Motion to Strike the Opinions of Dr. Erdem - re Status Conference. (Attachments: #1 Expert Report of Tulin Erdem, #2 Rebuttal Expert Report of Dr. Gareth Loy DMA on Validity Issues)(Tigan, Jeremy) (Attachment 2 replaced on 5/24/2016) (nmfn, ). (Attachment 1 replaced on 5/24/2016) (nmfn, ).
May 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 653 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #652 Letter, Declaration of Laura E. Stafford in Support of MobileMedia's Opposition to Apple's Motion to Exclude the Opinions of MobileMedia Expert John C. Jarosz by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Tigan, Jeremy) (Attachment 1 replaced on 5/24/2016) (nmfn, ).
May 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 652 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Jeremy A. Tigan regarding MobileMedia's Opposition to Apple's Motion to Exclude the Opinions of MobileMedia Expert John C. Jarosz - re #639 MOTION to Exclude MMI's Expert John C. Jarosz's Opinions Based on Apple Patents Asserted in Apple v Samsung . (Tigan, Jeremy)
May 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 651 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Tadahiro Kaburaki - filed by Apple Inc.. (Matterer, Mary)
May 12, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #650 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Joseph J. Mueller and Attorney Alexandra Wells Amrhein filed by Apple Inc. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 5/12/2016. (fms)
May 12, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #651 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Tadahiro Kaburaki filed by Apple Inc. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 5/12/2016. (fms)
May 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 650 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Joseph J. Mueller and Attorney Alexandra Wells Amrhein - filed by Apple Inc.. (Matterer, Mary)
May 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 649 REDACTED VERSION of #640 Declaration executed by Melody Drummond Hansen in support of Apple Inc.'s Motion to Exclude MMI's Expert John C. Jarosz's Opinions by Apple Inc.. (Matterer, Mary)
May 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 648 REDACTED VERSION of #639 MOTION to Exclude MMI's Expert John C. Jarosz's Opinions Based on Apple Patents Asserted in Apple v Samsung by Apple Inc.. (Matterer, Mary)
May 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 647 REDACTED VERSION of #637 Declaration executed by Luann L. Simmons in support of Apple Inc.'s Daubert Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Gareth Loy by Apple Inc.. (Matterer, Mary)
May 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 646 REDACTED VERSION of #636 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Gareth Loy, DMA, Regarding U.S. Patent No. 6,725,155 by Apple Inc.. (Matterer, Mary)
May 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 645 REDACTED VERSION of #635 Declaration, executed by Luann L. Simmons in support of Opening Brief of Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment on Damages by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2 - Part 1, #3 Exhibit 2 - Part 2, #4 Exhibits 3 - 8, #5 Exhibits 9 - 10, #6 Exhibits 11 - 20)(Matterer, Mary)
May 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 644 REDACTED VERSION of #634 Opening Brief in Support of Apple Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment on Damages by Apple Inc.. (Matterer, Mary)
May 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 643 REDACTED VERSION of #632 Letter by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy)
May 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 642 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Trial Witness List filed by Apple Inc..(Matterer, Mary)
May 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 641 NOTICE OF SERVICE of MobileMedia Ideas LLC's Fact Witness List for Trial re #575 Proposed Order filed by MobileMedia Ideas LLC.(Tigan, Jeremy)
May 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 640 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #639 MOTION to Exclude MMI's Expert John C. Jarosz's Opinions Based on Apple Patents Asserted in Apple v Samsung as executed by Melody Drummond Hansen by Apple Inc.. (Matterer, Mary)
May 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 639 [SEALED] MOTION to Exclude MMI's Expert John C. Jarosz's Opinions Based on Apple Patents Asserted in Apple v Samsung - filed by Apple Inc.. (Matterer, Mary)
May 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 638 Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Mary B. Matterer regarding Tulin Erdem submissions. (Matterer, Mary)
May 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 637 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #636 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Gareth Loy, DMA, Regarding U.S. Patent No. 6,725,155 as executed by Luann L. Simmons by Apple Inc.. (Matterer, Mary)
May 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 636 [SEALED] MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Gareth Loy, DMA, Regarding U.S. Patent No. 6,725,155 - filed by Apple Inc.. (Matterer, Mary)
May 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 635 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #633 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Damages, #634 Opening Brief in Support as executed by Luann L. Simmons by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Ex 1, #2 Ex 2 part 1, #3 Ex 2 part 2, #4 Exs 3 - 7, #5 Exs 8 - 10, #6 Exs 11 - 20)(Matterer, Mary)
May 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 634 [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re #633 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Damages filed by Apple Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 5/19/2016. (Matterer, Mary)
May 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 633 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Damages - filed by Apple Inc.. (Matterer, Mary)
May 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 632 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Jeremy A. Tigan regarding Apple's experts' opinions on non-infringing alternatives. (Tigan, Jeremy)
April 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sue L. Robinson - In-Person Status Conference held on 4/21/2016. (Court Reporter V. Gunning.) (nmfn)
April 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Reset Hearings: The In-Person Status Conference is rescheduled for 4/21/2016 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson. (nmfn)
April 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 631 ORDER denying #577 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 4/11/2016. (nmfn)
April 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 630 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 4/11/2016. (nmfn)
April 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 629 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Third Supplemental Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures and Second Supplemental Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 5 and 6) filed by Apple Inc..(Matterer, Mary)
April 1, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #628 Stipulated Dismissal of Claims and Counterclaims with Respect to U.S. Patent No. 6,393,430 filed by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 4/1/2016. (fms)
March 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 628 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Claims and Counterclaims with Respect to U.S. Patent No. 6,393,430 re #8 Amended Complaint, #50 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy)
March 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 627 NOTICE to Take Deposition of W. Christopher Bakewell on April 15, 2016 filed by MobileMedia Ideas LLC.(Tigan, Jeremy)
March 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 626 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Dr. Michael S. Braasch on April 8, 2016 filed by MobileMedia Ideas LLC.(Tigan, Jeremy)
March 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 625 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Dr. John P.J. Kelly on April 7, 2016 filed by MobileMedia Ideas LLC.(Tigan, Jeremy)
March 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 624 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Lynne J. Weber on April 13, 2016 filed by MobileMedia Ideas LLC.(Tigan, Jeremy)
March 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 623 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Gareth Loy, DMA on April 14, 2016 filed by Apple Inc..(Matterer, Mary)
March 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 622 NOTICE to Take Deposition of John C. Jarosz on April 5, 2016 filed by Apple Inc..(Matterer, Mary)
March 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 621 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Tulin Erdem, Ph.D. on April 1, 2016 filed by Apple Inc..(Matterer, Mary)
March 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 620 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Sigurd Meldal, Ph.D. on March 30, 2016 filed by Apple Inc..(Matterer, Mary)
March 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 619 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Dr. Ravin Balakrishnan on March 28, 2016 filed by MobileMedia Ideas LLC.(Tigan, Jeremy)
March 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 618 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Rebuttal Expert Report by Dr. Sigurd Meldal Concerning Alleged Design-Arounds for United States Patent No. RE39,231; (2) Rebuttal Expert Report by Dr. Gareth Loy Concerning Alleged Design-Arounds for United States Patent Nos. 6,725,155 and 6,393,430; and (3) Supplemental Expert Report of John C. Jarosz filed by MobileMedia Ideas LLC.(Tigan, Jeremy)
March 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 617 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Rebuttal Expert Report Regarding Damages of W. Christopher Bakewell; (2) Rebuttal Expert Report of Dr. Ravin Balakrishnan Regarding the February 19, 2016 Expert Report of Mr. John C. Jarosz; (3) Rebuttal Expert Report of Dr. Michael S. Braasch Regarding the February 19, 2016 Expert Reports of Tlin Erdem and John Jarosz with Respect to U.S. Patent No. 6,725,155; (4) Rebuttal Expert Report of Dr. John P.J. Kelly in Response to Expert Report of John C. Jarosz; and (5) Rebuttal Expert Report of Lynne J. Weber, Ph.D. Re: Expert Report of Tlin Erdem filed by Apple Inc..(Matterer, Mary)
February 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 616 Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Mary B. Matterer regarding request to reschedule trial date. (Matterer, Mary)
February 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 615 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Expert Report of Tulin Erdem; and (2) Expert Report of John C. Jarosz filed by MobileMedia Ideas LLC.(Tigan, Jeremy)
February 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 614 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Expert Report of Dr. Ravin Balakrishnan; Expert Report of Dr. Michael S. Braasch; and Expert Report of Dr. John P.J. Kelly filed by Apple Inc..(Matterer, Mary)
January 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 613 NOTICE OF SERVICE of First Supplemental Response to First Set of Interrogatories and Second Supplemental Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Apple Inc..(Matterer, Mary)
January 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 612 ORDER denying Apple's renewed request for the court to entertain summary judgment motions regarding validity under 101. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 1/29/2016. (nmfn)
January 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 611 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Justin J. Daniels by MobileMedia Ideas LLC (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 1/28/2016 (fms).
January 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 610 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Hang Zheng of PROSKAUER ROSE LLP - filed by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy)
January 28, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #610 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Hang Zheng of PROSKAUER ROSE LLP filed by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 1/28/2016. (fms)
January 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sue L. Robinson - Discovery Conference held on 1/28/2016. (Court Reporter V. Gunning.) (nmfn)
January 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Kimberly A. Mottley for MobileMedia Ideas LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (cna)
January 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Laura E. Stafford for MobileMedia Ideas LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (cna)
January 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney William D. Dalsen for MobileMedia Ideas LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (klc)
January 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 609 STIPULATION regarding 30(b)(6) deposition topics by Apple Inc.. (Matterer, Mary)
January 19, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #607 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney William D. Dalsen filed by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 1/19/2016. (fms)
January 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 608 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Plaintiff MobileMedia Ideas LLC's Objections and Responses to Defendant's Notice of Videotaped Deposition Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 30(b)(6) to Plaintiff MobileMedia; (2) Plaintiff MobileMedia Ideas LLC's Supplemental Objections and Responses to Defendant's Fifth Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 18 and 19); and (3) Plaintiff MobileMedia Ideas LLC's Supplemental Objections and Responses to Defendant's First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 3 and 9) filed by MobileMedia Ideas LLC.(Tigan, Jeremy)
January 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 607 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney William D. Dalsen - filed by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy)
January 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Set Hearings: A Discovery Conference is set for 1/28/2016 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson. (nmfn)
January 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 606 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Apple Inc.'s Objections to Plaintiff's 30(b)(6) Deposition Notice to Apple Inc. filed by Apple Inc..(Matterer, Mary)
January 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 605 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Plaintiff MobileMedia Ideas LLC's Objections and Responses to Defendant's Sixth Set of Interrogatories; and (2) Plaintiff MobileMedia Ideas LLC's Objections and Responses to Defendant's Second Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 49-54) filed by MobileMedia Ideas LLC.(Tigan, Jeremy)
January 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 604 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kimberly A. Mottley - filed by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy)
January 11, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #604 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kimberly A. Mottley filed by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 1/11/2016. (fms)
January 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 603 NOTICE of Subpoena (Boris Teksler) by MobileMedia Ideas LLC (Tigan, Jeremy)
December 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 602 REDACTED VERSION of #601 Notice (Other) of Subpoena as to Plantronics, Inc. by Apple Inc.. (Matterer, Mary)
December 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 601 [SEALED] NOTICE of Subpoena as to Plantronics, Inc. by Apple Inc. (Matterer, Mary)
December 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 600 REDACTED VERSION of #599 Notice to Take Deposition of MobileMedia Ideas LLC Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) by Apple Inc.. (Matterer, Mary)
December 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 599 [SEALED] NOTICE to Take Deposition of MobileMedia Ideas LLC Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) on January 26, 2016 filed by Apple Inc..(Matterer, Mary)
December 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sue L. Robinson - Oral Argument held on 12/21/2015. (Court Reporter V. Gunning.) (nmfn)
December 21, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #598 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Tim Byron filed by Apple Inc. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 12/21/2015. (fms)
December 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 598 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Tim Byron - filed by Apple Inc.. (Matterer, Mary)
December 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 597 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Michael Jaynes on January 29, 2016 filed by MobileMedia Ideas LLC.(Tigan, Jeremy)
December 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 596 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Apple Inc. on January 28, 2016 filed by MobileMedia Ideas LLC.(Tigan, Jeremy)
December 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 595 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Patrick Murphy on January 22, 2016 filed by MobileMedia Ideas LLC.(Tigan, Jeremy)
December 18, 2015 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: The pdf at D.I. #594 has been removed and replaced with a revised version. (fms)
December 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 594 MOTION for Teleconference to Resolve Discovery Dispute - filed by Apple Inc.. (Matterer, Mary) (Main Document 594 replaced on 12/18/2015) (fms).
December 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 593 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Laura Stafford - filed by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy)
December 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 592 REDACTED VERSION OF DECLARATION re #588 Declaration, in Support of Apple Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity and Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent No. RE 39,231 as executed by Luann L. Simmons by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Matterer, Mary) Modified on 12/15/2015 (fms).
December 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 591 REDACTED VERSION of #587 Reply Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity and Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent No. RE 39,231 by Apple Inc.. (Matterer, Mary)
December 15, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #593 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Laura Stafford filed by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 12/15/2015. (fms)
December 15, 2015 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: The docket text of D.I. #592 has been corrected to reflect that it is the redacted version of D.I. 588. (fms)
December 10, 2015 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: The docket text of D.I. #589 has been adjusted to reflect that it is the redacted version of D.I. 583. (fms)
December 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 590 REDACTED VERSION of #584 Declaration, (Dr. Sigurd Meldal) by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy)
December 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 589 REDACTED version of DECLARATION re #583 Declaration (Laura E. Stafford) by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 12/10/2015 (fms).
December 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 588 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #587 Reply Brief in Support of Apple Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity and Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent No. RE 39,231 as executed by Luann L. Simmons by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhs I - M, #2 Exh N part 1, #3 Exh N part 2, #4 Exh N part 3)(Matterer, Mary)
December 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 587 [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re #577 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity and Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent No. RE 39,231 filed by Apple Inc.. (Matterer, Mary)
December 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 586 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Apple Inc.'s Second Set of Requests for Admission (Nos. 49-54) to Plaintiff; and (2) Apple Inc.'s Fifth Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 21-23) to Plaintiff filed by Apple Inc..(Matterer, Mary)
December 8, 2015 Opinion or Order REDACTION NOTICE: In accordance with section G of the Administrative Procedures Governing Filing and Service by Electronic Means, redacted versions of sealed documents shall be filed electronically within 7 days of the filing of the sealed document. The records of this case do not reflect the filing of a redacted version of DI Nos. 583 and 584. (fms)
December 7, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #585 Stipulation of Dismissal OF CLAIMS AND COUNTERCLAIMS WITH RESPECT TO U.S. PATENT NOS. 6,446,080; 6,760,477; 7,349,012; 5,915,239; AND 5,490,170 filed by Apple Inc. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 12/7/2015. (fms)
December 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 585 STIPULATION of Dismissal OF CLAIMS AND COUNTERCLAIMS WITH RESPECT TO U.S. PATENT NOS. 6,446,080; 6,760,477; 7,349,012; 5,915,239; AND 5,490,170 by Apple Inc.. (Matterer, Mary)
November 25, 2015 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: Per request of filer, the main document and attachment #1 of D.I. 584 have been replaced with versions that include Dr. Meldal's actual signature and Exhibit F. (fms)
November 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 584 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #582 Answering Brief in Opposition, [of Dr. Sigurd Meldal] by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-H, #2 Exhibits I-O)(Tigan, Jeremy) (Main Document 584 replaced on 11/25/2015) (fms). (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/25/2015) (fms).
November 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 583 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #582 Answering Brief in Opposition, - Declaration of Laura E. Stafford by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Tigan, Jeremy)
November 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 582 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #577 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity and Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent No. RE 39,231 filed by MobileMedia Ideas LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 12/4/2015. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1)(Tigan, Jeremy)
November 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 581 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff MobileMedia Ideas LLC's Objections and Responses to Defendant's Fifth Set of Interrogatories filed by MobileMedia Ideas LLC.(Tigan, Jeremy)
October 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 580 REDACTED VERSION of #579 Declaration of Luann Simmons by Apple Inc.. (Matterer, Mary)
October 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 579 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #578 Opening Brief in Support, of Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity and Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent No. RE 39,231 executed by Luann L. Simmons by Apple Inc.. (Matterer, Mary)
October 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 578 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #577 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity and Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent No. RE 39,231 filed by Apple Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 11/6/2015. (Matterer, Mary)
October 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 577 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity and Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent No. RE 39,231 - filed by Apple Inc.. (Matterer, Mary)
October 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 576 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Apple's Fifth Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff (Nos.17-20) filed by Apple Inc..(Matterer, Mary)
September 22, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #575 SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Fact Discovery completed by 1/29/2016., An In-Person Status Conference re: Expert Discovery is set for 4/21/2016 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson, Dispositive Motions due by 5/2/2016., Answering Brief due 5/23/2016., Reply Brief due 6/13/2016., An Oral Argument is set for 6/28/2016 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson., Claim Construction Opening Brief due by 10/20/2015., Claim Construction Answering Brief due by 11/24/2015., Claim Construction Reply Brief due by 12/8/2015., A Hearing Regarding the '231 patent is set for 12/21/2015 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson., A Final Pretrial Conference is set for 8/3/2016 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson., A Jury Trial is set for 9/12/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson.). Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 9/22/2015. (nmfn)
September 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 575 PROPOSED ORDER Proposed Scheduling Order by Apple Inc.. (Matterer, Mary)
September 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 574 RULE 54(b) FINAL JUDGMENT of non-infringement of claim 73 of U.S. Patent No. 6,427,078 by the accused products in suit. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 9/17/2015. (nmfn)
September 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sue L. Robinson - Scheduling Conference held on 9/17/2015. (Court Reporter V. Gunning.) Counsel to submit the final proposed scheduling order to the court. (nmfn)
September 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Xin-Yi Zhou for Apple Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (klc)
September 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 573 STATEMENT - Case Management Statement and Proposed Scheduling Order by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Matterer, Mary)
September 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 572 PROPOSED ORDER - Proposed Rule 54(b) Final Judgment by Apple Inc.. (Matterer, Mary)
August 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 571 ORDER, On or before September 15, 2015, the parties shall submit a proposed form of order for the entry of a final judgment of noninfringement of claim 73 of the '078 patent, and the dismissal with prejudice of all remaining allegations of infringement relating to the currently accused products. ORDER, Setting Deadlines: ( Notice of Compliance deadline set for 9/15/2015.), Order Setting Scheduling Conference:( An In-Person Scheduling Conference is set for 9/17/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson). SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 8/28/2015. (nmfn)
August 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 570 Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding opposition to Apple's request to move for summary judgment of invalidity ('430 and '231 Patents) - re #567 Letter. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
August 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 569 Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding opposition to Apple's request for entry of final judgment of non-infringement of Claim 73 of '078 Patent - re #566 Letter. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
August 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 568 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Apple's objections and responses to Plaintiff's Fourth Set of Interrogatories; and (2) Apple's objections and responses to Plaintiff's Second Set of Requests for Production filed by Apple Inc..(Matterer, Mary)
July 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 567 Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Mary B. Matterer regarding request for leave to move for summary judgment related to the '430 and '231 Patents. (Matterer, Mary)
July 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 566 Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Mary B. Matterer regarding request for entry of final judgment with respect to the '078 Patent. (Matterer, Mary)
July 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 565 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Plaintiff's Fourth Set of Interrogatories; and (2) Plaintiff's Second Request for the Production of Documents and Things filed by MobileMedia Ideas LLC.(Tigan, Jeremy)
July 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sue L. Robinson - Telephone Conference held on 7/1/2015. (Court Reporter V. Gunning.) Submissions due 7/20/2015 and 8/10/2015. (nmfn)
June 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 564 ORDER Setting Hearings( A Telephone Conference is set for 7/1/2015 at 03:00 PM before Judge Sue L. Robinson). Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 6/8/2015. (fms)
June 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 563 MANDATE of USCA as to #550 Notice of Cross Appeal filed by MobileMedia Ideas LLC, #548 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit), filed by Apple Inc.. USCA Decision: Affirmed in part, Reversed in part, vacated, and remanded. (Attachments: #1 Mandate)(fms)
December 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 562 Official Transcript of telephone conference held on November 30, 2012 before Judge Robinson. Court Reporter/Transcriber Valerie Gunning,Telephone number 302-573-6194. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/27/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/6/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/6/2014. (vjg)
December 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 561 Official Transcript of hearing held on Judge Robinson before Judge November 8, 2012. Court Reporter/Transcriber Valerie Gunning,Telephone number 302-573-6194. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/27/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/6/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/6/2014. (vjg)
December 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 560 Official Transcript of telephone conference held on October 4, 2012 before Judge Thynge. Court Reporter/Transcriber Valerie Gunning,Telephone number 302-573-6194. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/27/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/6/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/6/2014. (vjg)
December 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 559 Official Transcript of telephone conference held on October 1, 2012 before Judge Thynge. Court Reporter/Transcriber Valerie Gunning,Telephone number 302-573-6194. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/27/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/6/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/6/2014. (vjg)
December 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 558 Official Transcript of telephone conference held on September 24, 2012 before Judge Thynge. Court Reporter/Transcriber Deanna Warner,Telephone number 302-658-6697. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/27/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/6/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/6/2014. (vjg)
December 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 557 Official Transcript of hearing held on August 2, 2012 before Judge Robinson. Court Reporter/Transcriber Valerie Gunning,Telephone number 302-573-6194. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/27/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/6/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/6/2014. (vjg)
December 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 556 Official Transcript of telephone conference held on June 11, 2012 before Judge Robinson. Court Reporter/Transcriber Valerie Gunning,Telephone number 302-573-6194. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/27/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/6/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/6/2014. (vjg)
December 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 555 Official Transcript of telephone conference held on June 7, 2012 before Judge Thynge. Court Reporter/Transcriber Valerie Gunning,Telephone number 302-573-6194. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/27/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/6/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/6/2014. (vjg)
December 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 554 Official Transcript of hearing held on April 17, 2012 before Judge Robinson. Court Reporter/Transcriber Valerie Gunning,Telephone number 302-573-6194. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/27/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/6/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/6/2014. (vjg)
December 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 553 Official Transcript of telephone conference held on May 6, 2011 before Judge Thynge. Court Reporter/Transcriber Heather Triozzi,Telephone number 302-658-66697. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/27/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/6/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/6/2014. (vjg)
November 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 552 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Apple Inc. for proceedings held on 5/6/2011, 4/17/2012, 6/7/2012, 6/11/2012, 8/2/2012, 9/24/2012, 10/1/2012, 10/4/2012, 11/8/2012, 11/30/2012 before Judge Sue L. Robinson and Judge Mary Pat Thynge, (Matterer, Mary)
November 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 551 NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA for the Federal Circuit re #550 Notice of Cross Appeal filed by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. USCA Case Number 14-1091 (fms)
November 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit re #550 Notice of Cross Appeal. (els)
November 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Notification regarding #550 Notice of Cross Appeal sent to Reporter Dibbs (els)
November 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Notification regarding #550 Notice of Cross Appeal sent to Reporter Gunning (els)
November 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 550 NOTICE OF CROSS APPEAL to the Federal Circuit of #546 Judgment , #461 , #462 , #470 , #498 , #539 , #540 , #541 , #542 . Cross Appeal filed by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 11/14/2013 (fms).
November 13, 2013 Opinion or Order APPEAL - Credit Card Payment of $ 455.00 received re #550 Notice of Cross Appeal filed by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. ( Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0311-1406516.) (Blumenfeld, Jack)
November 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 549 NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA for the Federal Circuit re #548 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit), filed by Apple Inc. USCA Case Number 14-1060. (fms)
November 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 548 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Federal Circuit of #462 Order on Motion to Strike,,, Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,,,,,,,, #461 Memorandum Opinion, #442 Order on Motion for Leave to File,, Order on Motion to Dismiss, #513 Judgment,, #541 Memorandum Opinion, #441 Memorandum Opinion, #542 Order on Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law,,,,, #546 Judgment . Appeal filed by Apple Inc.. (Matterer, Mary)
November 1, 2013 Opinion or Order APPEAL - Credit Card Payment of $ 455.00 received re #548 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit), filed by Apple Inc.. ( Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0311-1398359.) (Matterer, Mary)
November 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit re #548 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit),. (els)
November 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Notification regarding #548 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit), sent to Reporter Dibbs (els)
November 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Notification regarding #548 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit), sent to Reporter Gunning (els)
October 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 547 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,253,075 B1; 6,427,078 B1; RE39,231 E; 5,737,394; 6,002,390; 6,070,068; 6,393,430 B1; 6,441,828 B1; 6,446,080 B1; 6,549,942 B1; 6,760,477 B2; 7,313,647 B2; 7,349,012 B2; 5,915,239. (Attachments: #1 Judgment)(nmfn)
October 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 546 RULE 54(b) FINAL JUDGMENT (CASE CLOSED). Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 10/3/2013. (nmfn)
October 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 545 STIPULATION to the Entry of Proposed Rule 54(b) Final Judgment by Apple Inc., MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Blumenfeld, Jack)
September 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 544 ORDER, IT IS ORDERED that, on or before October 2, 2013, the parties shall file with the court a stipulated Rule 54(b) final judgment or, alternatively, a joint letter to the court delineating why agreement on the foregoing cannot be reached. ORDER, Setting Deadlines: ( Notice of Compliance deadline set for 10/2/2013.). Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 9/17/2013. (nmfn)
September 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 543 ORDER ADOPTING #457 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant's request for expenses under Rule 37 (D.I. #436 ) is granted to the extent explained in the Report and Recommendation. On or before September 30, 2013, plaintiff shall pay to defendant $13,682.08 in expenses. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 9/16/2013. (nmfn)
September 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 542 ORDER finding as moot #503 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law ; finding as moot #504 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law ; granting in part and denying in part #517 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 9/5/2013. (nmfn)
September 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 541 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 9/5/2013. (nmfn)
September 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 540 ORDER denying #469 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 9/5/2013. (nmfn)
September 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 539 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 9/5/2013. (nmfn)
August 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 538 Official Transcript of jury trial held on December 13, 2012 before Judge Robinson. Court Reporter/Transcriber Valerie Gunning,Telephone number 302-573-6194. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/18/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/30/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/26/2013. (vjg)
August 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 537 Official Transcript of jury trial held on December 12, 2012 before Judge Robinson. Court Reporter/Transcriber Valerie Gunning,Telephone number 302-573-6194. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/18/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/30/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/26/2013. (vjg)
August 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 536 Official Transcript of jury trial held on December 11, 2012 before Judge Robinson. Court Reporter/Transcriber Valerie Gunning,Telephone number 302-573-6194. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/18/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/30/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/26/2013. (vjg)
August 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 535 Official Transcript of jury trial held on December 10, 2012 before Judge Robinson. Court Reporter/Transcriber Valerie Gunning,Telephone number 302-573-6194. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/18/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/30/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/26/2013. (vjg)
August 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 534 Official Transcript of jury trial held on December 7, 2012 before Judge Robinson. Court Reporter/Transcriber Valerie Gunning,Telephone number 302-573-6194. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/18/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/30/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/26/2013. (vjg)
August 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 533 Official Transcript of jury trial held on December 6, 2012 before Judge Robinson. Court Reporter/Transcriber Valerie Gunning,Telephone number 302-573-6194. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/18/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/30/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/26/2013. (vjg)
August 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 532 Official Transcript of jury trial held on December 5, 2012 before Judge Robinson. Court Reporter/Transcriber Valerie Gunning,Telephone number 302-573-6194. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/18/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/30/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/26/2013. (vjg)
August 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 531 Official Transcript of jury trial held on December 4, 2012 before Judge Robinson. Court Reporter/Transcriber Valerie Gunning,Telephone number 302-573-6194. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/18/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/30/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/26/2013. (vjg)
August 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 530 Official Transcript of jury trial held on December 3, 2012 before Judge Robinson. Court Reporter/Transcriber Valerie Gunning,Telephone number 302-573-6194. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/18/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/30/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/26/2013. (vjg)
May 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 529 NOTICE of Subsequent Authority by Apple Inc. re #517 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law, #518 Opening Brief in Support (Matterer, Mary)
April 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 528 REDACTED VERSION of #521 Declaration of Laura E. Stafford by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy)
April 11, 2013 Opinion or Order REDACTION NOTICE: In accordance with section G of the Administrative Procedures Governing Filing and Service by Electronic Means, redacted versions of sealed documents shall be filed electronically within 7 days of the filing of the sealed document. The records of this case do not reflect the filing of a redacted version of DI # 521. (fms)
April 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 527 ORDER denying #526 Letter request. The court is not inclined to change its standard practice of bifurcating damages until the issue of liability has been decided by the Federal Circuit, until such time (if ever) the Federal Circuit requires the court to abandon said practice. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 4/2/2013. (nmfn)
March 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 526 Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding damages discovery. (Attachments: #1 Apple v. Samsung motion)(Blumenfeld, Jack)
March 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 525 Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Mary B. Matterer regarding enclosed CDs with linked copies of D.I. 523, Reply Brief in Support of Apple Inc.'s Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law and Motion for a New Trial - re #523 Reply Brief. (Matterer, Mary)
March 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 524 DECLARATION re #523 Reply Brief Declaration of Melody Drummond Hansen in support of Apple's Reply Brief in support of its Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law and for a New Trial by Apple Inc.. (Matterer, Mary)
March 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 523 REPLY BRIEF re #517 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law and Motion for a New Trial filed by Apple Inc.. (Matterer, Mary)
February 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 522 Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Jeremy A. Tigan regarding electronic version of answering brief. (Tigan, Jeremy)
February 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 521 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #520 Answering Brief in Opposition Declaration of Laura E. Stafford by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy)
February 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 520 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #517 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law filed by MobileMedia Ideas LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 3/7/2013. (Tigan, Jeremy)
January 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 519 Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Mary B. Matterer regarding enclosed CDs with Apple's opening post-trial brief - re #518 Opening Brief in Support. (Matterer, Mary)
January 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 518 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #517 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law and Motion for a New Trial filed by Apple Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 2/14/2013. (Matterer, Mary)
January 28, 2013 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: D.I. #517 has been modified per request of filer to reflect that it is a motion for post trial relief as stated in the caption of the document. It was previously docketed as a statement. (nmfn)
January 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 517 Apple's MOTION for POST-TRIAL RELIEF #513 Judgment,, #504 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Apple's Motion for Post-Trial Relief by Apple Inc.. (Matterer, Mary) Modified on 1/28/2013 (nmfn, ). Modified on 1/28/2013 (nmfn).
January 7, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #516 Stipulation Setting Post-Trial Briefing Schedule filed by Apple Inc., MobileMedia Ideas LLC. 1. The Parties will file any renewed post-trial motions and supporting briefs pursuant to Rules 50 and/or 59 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure according to the following schedule: Motions and Opening Briefs: January 28, 2013 Answering Briefs: February 25, 2013 Reply Briefs: March 18, 20132. All opening and answering briefs shall be limited to 30 pages, and reply briefs shall be limited to 15 pages. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 1/7/2013. (fms)
January 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 516 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Setting Post-Trial Briefing Schedule by Apple Inc., MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Matterer, Mary)
January 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 515 REDACTED VERSION of #494 Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Jack B. Blumenfeld by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-F)(Tigan, Jeremy)
January 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 514 REDACTED VERSION of #493 Letter from Mary B. Matterer regarding supplemental expert report issue by Apple Inc.. (Matterer, Mary)
December 28, 2012 Opinion or Order REDACTION NOTICE: In accordance with section G of the Administrative Procedures Governing Filing and Service by Electronic Means, redacted versions of sealed documents shall be filed electronically within 7 days of the filing of the sealed document. The records of this case do not reflect the filing of a redacted version of DI Nos. 493 and 494. (fms)
December 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 513 JUDGMENT FOLLOWING A JURY VERDICT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 58(b) IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that judgment be and is hereby entered in favor of plaintiff MobileMedia Ideas, LLC and against defendant Apple Inc. as to direct infringement and validity of claims 23 and 24 of the '068 patent, claims 5, 6 and 10 of the '075 patent and claim 73 of the '078 patent. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that judgment be and is hereby entered in favor of defendant Apple Inc. and against plaintiff MobileMedia Ideas LLC as to induced infringement of claims 23 and 24 of the '068 patent and claims 5 and 6 of the '075 patent.. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 12/17/2012. (nmfn)
December 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 512 ORDER directing that jurors be provided lunch (cc: Finance). Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 12/17/2012. (nmfn)
December 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 511 Jury Trial Exhibit List for the jury trial held 12/3-12/13/2012. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List)(fms)
December 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 510 REDACTED VERSION of #502 Respone to Objections Response to MMI's Objections to October 31st Report & Recommendation by Apple Inc.. (Herrmann, Richard)
December 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 509 SEALED Jury Notes. (fms) (fms).
December 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 508 SEALED Jury List. (fms) (fms).
December 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 507 REDACTED VERSION of #506 Jury Verdict. (fms)
December 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 506 SEALED JURY VERDICT. (fms) (fms).
December 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sue L. Robinson - Jury Trial completed on 12/13/2012 (DAY 9). (Court Reporter V. Gunning.) (fms)
December 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sue L. Robinson - Jury Trial Deliberations on 12/12/2012 (DAY 8). (Court Reporter V. Gunning.) (fms)
December 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 505 Final Jury Instructions (read in open court by Judge Robinson on 12/11/12). (fms)
December 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 504 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law - filed by Apple Inc.. (Elliott, Tara)
December 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 503 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law - filed by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
December 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sue L. Robinson - Jury Trial held on 12/11/2012 (DAY 7). (Court Reporter V. Gunning.) (fms)
December 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sue L. Robinson - Jury Trial held on 12/10/2012 (DAY 6). (Court Reporter V. Gunning.) (fms)
December 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sue L. Robinson - Jury Trial held on 12/7/2012 (DAY 5). (Court Reporter V. Gunning.) (fms)
December 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sue L. Robinson - Jury Trial held on 12/6/2012 (DAY 4). (Court Reporter V. Gunning.) (fms)
December 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 502 [SEALED] RESPONSE TO OBJECTIONS by Apple Inc. re #472 Objection to Report and Recommendations Granting Attorneys' Fees. (Herrmann, Richard)
December 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sue L. Robinson - Jury Trial held on 12/5/2012 (DAY 3). (Court Reporter V. Gunning.) (fms)
December 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sue L. Robinson - Jury Trial held on 12/4/2012 (DAY 2). (Court Reporter V. Gunning.) (fms)
December 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 501 Letter to Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Tara D. Elliott regarding requesting curative instruction. (Elliott, Tara)
December 4, 2012 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 496 Stipulation re Source Code and Accused Products re 459 Proposed Pretrial Order filed by Apple Inc., MobileMedia Ideas LLC. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 12/4/2012. (fms)
December 4, 2012 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #496 Stipulation re Source Code and Accused Products re #459 Proposed Pretrial Order filed by Apple Inc., MobileMedia Ideas LLC. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 12/4/2012. (fms)
December 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 500 Preliminary Jury Instructions (read by Judge Robinson in open court on 12/3/2012). (fms) Modified on 12/3/2012 (fms).
December 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 499 Voir Dire To Jury Panel (read by Judge Robinson in open court on 12/3/2012). (fms)
December 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 498 MEMORANDUM ORDER that MobileMedia is precluded from offering at trial Dr. Meldal's testimony regarding the "Release Complete" message constituting the "rejection message" claimed in the '075 patent re #493 Letter, #494 Letter. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 12/3/2012. (nmfn)
December 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 497 Official Transcript of telephone conference held on November 21, 2012 before Judge Robinson. Court Reporter/Transcriber Valerie Gunning,Telephone number (302) 573-6194. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/26/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/3/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/4/2013. (vjg)
December 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sue L. Robinson - Jury Trial held on 12/3/2012 (DAY 1). (Court Reporter V. Gunning.) (fms)
December 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 496 STIPULATION re Source Code and Accused Products re #459 Proposed Pretrial Order by Apple Inc., MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tigan, Jeremy)
November 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 495 Proposed Jury Instructions by Apple Inc., MobileMedia Ideas LLC . (Tigan, Jeremy)
November 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 494 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Jack B. Blumenfeld - re #493 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-F)(Blumenfeld, Jack)
November 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 493 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Mary B. Matterer regarding supplemental expert report issue. (Matterer, Mary)
November 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 492 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John M. Farrell and Lauren A. Degnan - filed by Apple Inc.. (Elliott, Tara)
November 30, 2012 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 492 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John M. Farrell and Lauren A. Degnan filed by Apple Inc.. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 11/30/2012. (fms)
November 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sue L. Robinson - Telephone Conference held on 11/30/2012. (Court Reporter V. Gunning.) (fms)
November 30, 2012 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #492 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John M. Farrell and Lauren A. Degnan filed by Apple Inc.. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 11/30/2012. (fms)
November 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 491 Exhibit List Joint Trial Exhibit List by Apple Inc., MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy)
November 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 490 Exhibit List MobileMedia Ideas LLC's Final Trial Exhibit List with Apple Inc.'s Objections by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy)
November 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 489 Exhibit List Apple's Final Trial Exhibit List and MobileMedia's Objections by Apple Inc.. (Matterer, Mary)
November 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 488 Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Mary B. Matterer regarding Apple's request to bring equipment into the courtroom for trial. (Matterer, Mary)
November 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Set Hearings: A Telephone Conference is set for 11/30/2012 at 10:00 AM before Judge Sue L. Robinson (nmfn)
November 29, 2012 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 484 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to file proposed final jury instructions to November 30, 2012 filed by Apple Inc., MobileMedia Ideas LLC. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 11/29/2012. (fms)
November 29, 2012 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #484 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to file proposed final jury instructions to November 30, 2012 filed by Apple Inc., MobileMedia Ideas LLC. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 11/29/2012. (fms)
November 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 487 VERDICT SHEET by MobileMedia Ideas LLC . (Tigan, Jeremy)
November 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 486 Proposed Jury Instructions by Apple Inc., MobileMedia Ideas LLC . (Tigan, Jeremy)
November 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 485 Proposed Voir Dire by Apple Inc., MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy)
November 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 484 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to file proposed final jury instructions to November 30, 2012 - filed by Apple Inc., MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Matterer, Mary)
November 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 483 VERDICT SHEET by Apple Inc. Apple's Proposed Verdict Sheet. (Matterer, Mary)
November 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 482 Exhibit List [JOINT PROPOSED TRIAL EXHIBIT LIST] by Apple Inc., MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy)
November 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 481 Exhibit List MOBILEMEDIA IDEAS LLC'S PROPOSED TRIAL EXHIBITS AND APPLE INC.'S OBJECTIONS by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy)
November 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 480 Exhibit List Apple's Proposed Trial Exhibits and MobileMedia's Objections by Apple Inc.. (Herrmann, Richard)
November 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 479 DECLARATION re #478 Answering Brief in Opposition, Declaration of Luann L. Simmons in support of Apple's Opposition to MobileMedia's Motion for Reargument by Apple Inc.. (Herrmann, Richard)
November 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 478 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #469 MOTION for Reconsideration re #462 Order on Motion to Strike,,, Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,,,,,,,, #461 Memorandum Opinion [MOBILEMEDIA'S MOTION FOR REARGUMENT REGARDING U.S. PATE filed by Apple Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 12/6/2012. (Herrmann, Richard)
November 26, 2012 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 473 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Timothy W. Mungovan of PROSKAUER ROSE LLP filed by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 11/26/2012. (nmfn)
November 26, 2012 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 476 Stipulation re: Exhibit Lists filed by Apple Inc., MobileMedia Ideas LLC. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 11/26/2012. (nmfn)
November 26, 2012 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #476 Stipulation re: Exhibit Lists filed by Apple Inc., MobileMedia Ideas LLC. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 11/26/2012. (nmfn)
November 26, 2012 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #473 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Timothy W. Mungovan of PROSKAUER ROSE LLP filed by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 11/26/2012. (nmfn)
November 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 477 NOTICE OF SERVICE of MobileMedia's Trial Witness List by MobileMedia Ideas LLC.(Tigan, Jeremy)
November 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 476 Joint STIPULATION regarding exhibit lists by Apple Inc., MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Matterer, Mary)
November 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 475 Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Regina S.E. Murphy regarding copy of unreported opinion cited in MobileMedia's Objections - re #472 Objection to Report and Recommendations. (Attachments: #1 (Unreported Opinion))(Murphy, Regina)
November 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sue L. Robinson - Telephone Conference held on 11/21/2012. (Court Reporter V. Gunning.) (nmfn)
November 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 474 Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding the parties' summary of issues in preparation of teleconference. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
November 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 473 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Timothy W. Mungovan of PROSKAUER ROSE LLP - filed by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy)
November 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 472 OBJECTION to #457 Report and Recommendations Granting Attorneys' Fees to Defendant Apple Inc. by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Murphy, Regina)
November 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Reset Hearings: The Telephone Conference is re-set per unopposed request of counsel for 11/21/2012 at 11:00 AM before Judge Sue L. Robinson. (nmfn)
November 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 471 ORDER setting briefing schedule re #469 MOTION for Reconsideration re #462 Order on Motion to Strike, Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, #461 Memorandum Opinion [MOBILEMEDIA'S MOTION FOR REARGUMENT REGARDING U.S. PATENT NO. RE 39,231 : Answering Brief due 11/26/2012. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 11/16/2012. (nmfn)
November 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 470 MEMORANDUM ORDER, claims 1-3 of the '078 patent are to be excluded at trial. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 11/15/2012. (nmfn)
November 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 469 MOTION for Reconsideration re #462 Order on Motion to Strike,,, Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,,,,,,,, #461 Memorandum Opinion [MOBILEMEDIA'S MOTION FOR REARGUMENT REGARDING U.S. PATENT NO. RE 39,231] - filed by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
November 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 468 REDACTED VERSION of #467 Exhibit to a Document by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy)
November 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 467 [SEALED] EXHIBIT re #466 Letter [Exhibits D and E] by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Blumenfeld, Jack)
November 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 466 Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding amended claim 1 of U.S. Patent No. 6,427,078. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-C, #2 Exhibits D-E [Filed Separately Under Seal])(Blumenfeld, Jack)
November 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 465 Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Mary B. Matterer regarding amended claims in the 078 patent. (Matterer, Mary)
November 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 464 ORDER Setting Teleconference: plaintiff to initiate the call. A Telephone Conference is set for 11/20/2012 at 10:00 AM before Judge Sue L. Robinson. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the time by which the parties shall file their proposed preliminary and final jury instructions, voir dire questions, and special verdict or special interrogatories forms shall be extended through and including 11/28/2012. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 11/9/2012. (nmfn)
November 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Reset Hearings: The Telephone Conference is reset for 11/21/2012 at 10:00 AM before Judge Sue L. Robinson to reflect the date offered to counsel during the pretrial conference. (nmfn)
November 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 463 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Frank E. Scherkenbach - filed by Apple Inc.. (Elliott, Tara)
November 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 462 ORDER denying #377 Motion to Strike ; denying #414 Motion to Strike ; finding as moot #265 Motion to Strike ; granting #300 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part #305 Motion for Summary Judgment ; granting in part and denying in part #328 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part #329 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 11/8/2012. (nmfn)
November 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 461 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 11/8/2012. (nmfn)
November 8, 2012 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 463 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Frank E. Scherkenbach filed by Apple Inc. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 11/8/2012. (fms)
November 8, 2012 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #463 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Frank E. Scherkenbach filed by Apple Inc. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 11/8/2012. (fms)
November 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sue L. Robinson - Final Pretrial Conference held on 11/8/2012. (Court Reporter V. Gunning.) (nmfn)
November 8, 2012 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 459 Proposed Pretrial Order filed by Apple Inc., MobileMedia Ideas LLC. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 11/8/2012. (nmfn)
November 8, 2012 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #459 Proposed Pretrial Order filed by Apple Inc., MobileMedia Ideas LLC. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 11/8/2012. (nmfn)
November 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Melody N. Drummond Hanson for Apple Inc. added for electronic noticing. (rbe)
November 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 460 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME by which the parties shall file their proposed prelminary and final jury instructions, voir dire questions, and special verdict or special interrogatories forms to November 20, 2012 (pending issuance of a claim construction or summary judgment ruling by the Court) - filed by Apple Inc., MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy)
November 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 459 Proposed Pretrial Order by Apple Inc., MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1 through 14)(Tigan, Jeremy)
November 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 458 NOTICE of Appearance by Tara D. Elliott on behalf of Apple Inc. (Elliott, Tara)
October 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 457 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS Defendants request for expenses under Rule 37 (D.I. 436) be granted in part and denied in part. Please note that when filing Objections pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b)(2), briefing consists solely of the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages) and the Response to the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages). No further briefing shall be permitted with respect to objections without leave of the Court. Objections to R&R due by 11/19/2012. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 10/31/2012. (cak)
October 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 456 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Ruffin B. Cordell - filed by Apple Inc.. (Herrmann, Richard)
October 18, 2012 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #456 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Ruffin B. Cordell filed by Apple Inc.. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 10/18/2012. (fms)
October 18, 2012 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 456 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Ruffin B. Cordell filed by Apple Inc.. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 10/18/2012. (fms)
October 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mary Pat Thynge - Telephone Conference held on 10/4/2012; The transcript shall serve as the order of the court. (Court Reporter Val Gunning.) (kjk)
October 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 455 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rebuttal Trial Witness List by Apple Inc..(Herrmann, Richard)
October 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 454 ORAL ORDER: A follow-up to the 10/1/2012 teleconference has been scheduled for 10/4/2012 at 11:15 AM with Judge Thynge. Counsel for plaintiff to initiate the call. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 10/1/2012. (cak)
October 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mary Pat Thynge - Telephone Conference held on 10/1/2012. (Court Reporter Valerie Gunning.) (cak)
September 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 453 NOTICE OF SERVICE of MobileMedia Ideas LLC's Rebuttal Fact Witness List For Trial by MobileMedia Ideas LLC.(Tigan, Jeremy)
September 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 452 ORAL ORDER: A follow-up to the 9/21/2012 teleconference has been scheduled for 10/1/2012 at 11:L00 AM with Judge Thynge. Counsel for Mobile Media to initiate the call. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 9/25/2012. (cak)
September 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mary Pat Thynge - Telephone Conference held on 9/24/2012; The transcript shall serve as the order of the court. (Court Reporter Deanna Warner - Hawkins Reporting.) (kjk)
September 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 451 Letter to The Honorable Mary Pat Thynge from Mary B. Matterer regarding response to Plaintiff's September 20, 2012 discovery dispute letter - re #450 Letter. (Matterer, Mary)
September 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 450 Letter to The Honorable Mary Pat Thynge from Rodger D. Smith II regarding issues for discovery conference set for September 24, 2012 (D.I. 448). (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-E, #2 Exhibits F-K)(Smith, Rodger)
September 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 449 MOTION for Hearing (Teleconference) to Resolve Discovery Dispute - filed by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. Motions referred to Mary Pat Thynge.(Smith, Rodger)
September 17, 2012 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: The Order for DI 448 has been replaced with the correct version. (cak)
September 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 448 ORDER Setting Teleconference: Rodger D. Smith, Esquire to initiate the call. A Telephone Conference is set for 9/24/2012 at 11:00 AM before Judge Mary Pat Thynge to address a discovery issue. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 9/13/2012. (cak) (Main Document 448 replaced on 9/17/2012) (cak).
September 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 447 MEMORANDUM ORDER Apples motion for discovery #310 from MMI and Nokia is DENIED. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 9/10/2012. (cak)
September 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 446 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Trial Witness List and (2) First Supplemental Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures by Apple Inc..(Matterer, Mary)
September 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 445 Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Mary B. Matterer regarding supplemental authority from the Eastern District of Texas related to claim construction. (Matterer, Mary)
September 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 444 NOTICE of Subsequent Proceedings by MobileMedia Ideas LLC re Oral Argument Summary Judgment Motions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D)(Tigan, Jeremy)
August 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 443 NOTICE OF SERVICE of MobileMedia Ideas LLC's Fact Witness List For Trial by MobileMedia Ideas LLC.(Tigan, Jeremy)
August 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 442 ORDER granting #361 Motion for Leave to File; granting #402 Motion for Leave to File; denying #226 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 8/16/2012. (nmfn)
August 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 441 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 8/16/2012. (nmfn)
August 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 440 Letter to The Honorable Mary Pat Thynge from Rodger D. Smith II regarding response to Apple's request for attorneys' fees (D.I. 436) - re #436 Letter,. (Smith, Rodger)
August 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 439 REDACTED VERSION of #437 Declaration by Apple Inc.. (Matterer, Mary)
August 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 438 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Exchange Lists of Fact Witnesses to be Called at Trial to August 31, 2012, Exchange Lists of Rebuttal Fact Witnesses to be Called at Trial to September 28, 2012, Deadline to Depose Disclosed Trial Witnesses to November 2, 2012 to - filed by Apple Inc., MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Matterer, Mary)
August 8, 2012 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 438 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Exchange Lists of Fact Witnesses to be Called at Trial to August 31, 2012, Exchange Lists of Rebuttal Fact Witnesses to be Called at Trial to September 28, 2012, Deadline to Depose Disclosed Trial Witnesses to November 2, 20 filed by Apple Inc., MobileMedia Ideas LLC. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 8/8/2012. (fms)
August 8, 2012 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #438 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Exchange Lists of Fact Witnesses to be Called at Trial to August 31, 2012, Exchange Lists of Rebuttal Fact Witnesses to be Called at Trial to September 28, 2012, Deadline to Depose Disclosed Trial Witnesses to November 2, 20 filed by Apple Inc., MobileMedia Ideas LLC. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 8/8/2012. (fms)
August 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 437 SEALED DECLARATION re #436 Letter, Sealed Declaration of Luann Simmons in support of Apple's Request for Fees relating to MobileMedia's Violations of the Protective Order by Apple Inc.. (Matterer, Mary)
August 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 436 Letter to The Honorable Mary Pat Thynge from Mary B. Matterer regarding request for Apple's fees regarding MMI's violations of the Court's May 16, 2011 Protective Order in connection with MMI's experts' review of Apple's source code. (Matterer, Mary)
August 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sue L. Robinson - Oral Argument held on 8/2/2012. (Court Reporter V. Gunning.) (nmfn)
August 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 435 REDACTED VERSION of #428 Letter to The Honorable Mary Pat Thynge from Richard K. Herrmann regarding Protective Order by Apple Inc.. (Herrmann, Richard)
August 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 434 Official Transcript of telephone conference held on July 30, 2012 before Judge Magistrate Thynge. Court Reporter/Transcriber Valerie Gunning,Telephone number (302) 573-6194. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/22/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/4/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/30/2012. (vjg)
August 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 433 Official Transcript of hearing held on Juy 27, 2012 before Judge Robinson. Court Reporter/Transcriber Valerie Gunning,Telephone number (302) 573-6194. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/22/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/4/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/30/2012. (vjg)
July 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mary Pat Thynge - Telephone Conference held on 7/30/2012; The transcript shall serve as the order of the court. (Court Reporter Val Gunning.) (kjk)
July 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Set Hearings: An Oral Argument is set for 8/2/2012 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson. (nmfn)
July 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sue L. Robinson - Oral Argument held on 7/27/2012. (Court Reporter V. Gunning.) (nmfn)
July 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 432 Letter to The Honorable Mary Pat Thynge from Rodger D. Smith II regarding Response to Apple's July 25, 2012 Letter - re #428 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C)(Smith, Rodger)
July 26, 2012 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 430 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jonathan Crawford filed by Apple Inc.. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 7/26/2012. (fms)
July 26, 2012 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #430 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jonathan Crawford filed by Apple Inc.. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 7/26/2012. (fms)
July 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 431 REPLY BRIEF re #414 Cross MOTION to Strike Portions of Apple's Grimes Declaration filed by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy)
July 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 430 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jonathan Crawford - filed by Apple Inc.. (Herrmann, Richard)
July 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 429 Letter to counsel from Judge Robinson regarding oral argument on Friday, July 27, 2012 - re #425 Letter. (nmfn)
July 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 428 SEALED Letter to The Honorable Mary Pat Thynge from Richard K. Herrmann regarding Protective Order. (Herrmann, Richard)
July 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 427 REDACTED VERSION of #424 Declaration, by Apple Inc.. (Herrmann, Richard)
July 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 426 REDACTED VERSION of #423 Brief (Combined Answering and Reply), by Apple Inc.. (Herrmann, Richard)
July 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 425 Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding order of presentation of the claim construction and summary judgment issues for the July 27, 2012 hearing. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
July 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 424 SEALED DECLARATION re #423 Brief (Combined Answering and Reply), in Support of Apple's Motion to Strike Portions of the Untimely Supplemental Expert Report of Dr. Gareth Loy and Declarations of Dr. Gareth Loy and Dr. Sigurd Meldal executed by Marc M. Breverman by Apple Inc.. (Herrmann, Richard)
July 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 423 SEALED BRIEF (Combined Answering and Reply) (FILED UNDER SEAL) re #414 Cross MOTION to Strike Portions of Apple's Grimes Declaration, #377 MOTION to Strike Portions of the Untimely Supplemental Expert Report of Dr. Gareth Loy and Declarations of Dr. Gareth Loy and Dr. Sigurd Meldal filed by Apple Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 7/30/2012. (Herrmann, Richard) Modified on 7/20/2012 (fms).
July 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 422 REDACTED VERSION of #407 Reply Brief by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy)
July 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 421 REDACTED VERSION of #408 Declaration, of Laura E. Stafford by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy)
July 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 420 REDACTED VERSION of #415 Answering Brief in Opposition,, by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-7)(Tigan, Jeremy)
July 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 419 REDACTED VERSION of #412 Reply Brief in support of Apple's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement by Apple Inc.. (Matterer, Mary)
July 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 418 REDACTED VERSION of #411 Declaration of Luann L. Simmons in support of Reply Brief in support of Apple's Motion for Partial Sumary Judgment and Apple's Sur-Reply Claim Construction Brief by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Part 2 of Exhibit Tabs (Tabs 125 - 132))(Matterer, Mary)
July 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 417 REDACTED VERSION of #410 Claim Construction Surreply Brief by Apple Inc.. (Matterer, Mary)
July 11, 2012 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: The docket text of D.I. #415 has been corrected. The code "Brief - Combined Opening and Answering" should have been used to docket D.I. #415 . (fms)
July 11, 2012 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: The docket text of D.I. 415 has been corrected. The code "Brief - Combined Opening and Answering" should have been used to docket D.I. 415 . (fms)
July 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 416 Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Richard K. Herrmann regarding enclosed upgraded DVDs - re #412 Reply Brief, #410 Claim Construction Surreply Brief. (Herrmann, Richard)
July 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 415 SEALED ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #377 MOTION to Strike Portions of the Untimely Supplemental Expert Report of Dr. Gareth Loy and Declarations of Dr. Gareth Loy and Dr. Sigurd Meldal and OPENING BRIEF in Support of Cross-Motion to Strike Portions of the Declaration of Dr. Jack D. Grimes #414 filed by MobileMedia Ideas LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 7/19/2012. Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 7/26/2012 (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-7)(Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 7/11/2012 (fms).
July 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 414 Cross MOTION to Strike Portions of Apple's Grimes Declaration - filed by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy)
July 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 413 Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Richard K. Herrmann regarding electronic versions of briefing. (Herrmann, Richard)
July 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 412 SEALED REPLY BRIEF re #328 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement filed by Apple Inc.. (Matterer, Mary)
July 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 411 SEALED DECLARATION re #410 Claim Construction Surreply Brief and Reply Brief in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Non-Infringment (Second Declaration of Luann L. Simmons) by Apple Inc.. (Matterer, Mary)
July 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 410 SEALED CLAIM CONSTRUCTION SURREPLY BRIEF re #327 Claim Construction Answering Brief filed by Apple Inc.. (Matterer, Mary)
July 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 409 Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Jeremy A. Tigan regarding electronic version of brief - re #407 Reply Brief. (Tigan, Jeremy)
July 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 408 SEALED DECLARATION re #407 Reply Brief [Declaration of Laura E. Stafford in Support of MobileMedia's Reply in Support of MobileMedia's Motion for Summary Judgment of No Invalidity (with Exhibits 1-4)] by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy)
July 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 407 SEALED REPLY BRIEF re #329 MOTION for Summary Judgment [PLAINTIFF MOBILEMEDIA IDEAS LLC'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NO INVALIDITY] filed by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy)
July 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 406 REDACTED VERSION of #402 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File a Response to Apple's Proposed Supplemental Brief on Apple's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Standing (Unopposed) by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Tigan, Jeremy)
July 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 405 REDACTED VERSION of #354 Declaration of Peter C. Toto by Nokia Corporation. (Farnan, Brian)
July 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 404 REDACTED VERSION of #353 Declaration of Benjamin C. Adams by Nokia Corporation. (Farnan, Brian)
July 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 403 REDACTED VERSION of #352 Letter by Nokia Corporation. (Farnan, Brian)
June 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 402 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File a Response to Apple's Proposed Supplemental Brief on Apple's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Standing (Unopposed) - filed by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Tigan, Jeremy)
June 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 401 REDACTED VERSION of #365 Declaration of Brett J. Blank in Support of MobileMedia's (1) Opposition to Apple's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Non-Infingement and (2) Reply in Support of MobileMedia's Motion for Partial Summary Judgement on Apple's Affirmative Defenses of Estoppel, Waiver and Prosecution History Estoppel by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-22, #2 Exhibits 23-30)(Tigan, Jeremy)
June 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 400 REDACTED VERSION of #363 Claim Construction Reply Brief by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits H-K)(Tigan, Jeremy)
June 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 399 REDACTED VERSION of #366 Declaration of Dr. Gareth Loy DMA in Opposition to Apple, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement of the '155 Patent by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy)
June 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 398 REDACTED VERSION of #367 Declaration of Dr. Sigurd Meldal in Support of MobileMedia Ideas LLC's Brief in Opposition to Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy)
June 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 397 REDACTED VERSION of #368 Declaration of Dr. Time A. Williams, Ph.D. in Support of MobileMedia Ideas LLC's Opposition to Apple Inc.'s Summary Judgment Motion for Noninfringement of the '828 Patent and '942 Patent by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy)
June 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 396 REDACTED VERSION of #364 Brief (Combined Answering and Reply),, MobileMedia's Opposition to Apple's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement and Reply in Support of MobileMedia's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Apple's Affirmative Defenses of Estoppel, Waiver and Prosecution History Estoppel by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy)
June 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 395 REDACTED VERSION of #376 Declaration of Luann Simmons in Support of Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity by Apple Inc.. (Matterer, Mary)
June 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 394 REDACTED VERSION of #375 Brief (Combined Answering and Reply), in Support of Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity and Opposition to Plaintiff's Cross-Motion of No Invalidity by Apple Inc.. (Matterer, Mary)
June 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 393 REDACTED VERSION of #379 Declaration, of Mark Breverman in Support of Apple's Motion to Strike by Apple Inc.. (Matterer, Mary)
June 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 392 REDACTED VERSION of #378 Opening Brief in Support, re Apple's Motion to Strike Portions of the Untimely Supplemental Expert Report of Dr. Gareth Loy and Declarations of Dr. Gareth Loy and Dr. Sigurd Meldal by Apple Inc.. (Matterer, Mary)
June 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 391 REDACTED VERSION of #370 Letter to Judge Thynge responding to MMI's and Nokia's discovery dispute letters by Apple Inc.. (Herrmann, Richard) Modified on 6/29/2012 (fms).
June 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 390 Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Jeremy A. Tigan regarding updated electronic versions of claim construction and summary judgment briefs being submitted on DVD - re #364 Brief (Combined Answering and Reply),, #303 Claim Construction Opening Brief, #363 Claim Construction Reply Brief, #332 Brief (Combined Opening and Answering),,. (Tigan, Jeremy)
June 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 389 REDACTED VERSION of #361 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Standing (Unopposed) by Apple Inc.. (Herrmann, Richard)
June 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 388 Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Richard K. Herrmann regarding enclosed upgraded DVD with links - re #380 Letter,. (Herrmann, Richard)
June 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 387 JOINT APPENDIX for Claim Construction Briefing (Volume 7 of 7) by Apple Inc., MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (fms) (rwc). Scanned on 1/14/2016 (rwc).
June 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 386 JOINT APPENDIX for Claim Construction Briefing (Volume 6 of 7) by Apple Inc., MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (fms) (rwc). Scanned on 1/14/2016 (rwc).
June 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 385 JOINT APPENDIX for Claim Construction Briefing (Volume 5 of 7) by Apple Inc., MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (fms) (rwc). Scanned on 1/13/2016 (rwc).
June 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 384 JOINT APPENDIX for Claim Construction Briefing (Volume 4 of 7) by Apple Inc., MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (fms) (rwc). Scanned on 1/13/2016 (rwc).
June 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 383 JOINT APPENDIX for Claim Construction Briefing (Volume 3 of 7) by Apple Inc., MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (fms) (rwc). Scanned on 1/13/2016 (rwc).
June 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 382 JOINT APPENDIX for Claim Construction Briefing (Volume 2 of 7) by Apple Inc., MobileMedia Ideas LLC.(fms) (rwc). Scanned on 1/12/2016 (rwc).
June 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 381 JOINT APPENDIX for Claim Construction Briefing (Volume 1 of 7) by Apple Inc., MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (fms) . Scanned on 1/11/2016 (rwc).
June 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 380 Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Richard K. Herrmann regarding enclosed briefs on DVD - re #327 Claim Construction Answering Brief, #330 Brief (Combined Opening and Answering), #375 Brief (Combined Answering and Reply), #323 Amended Document. (Herrmann, Richard)
June 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 379 SEALED DECLARATION re #377 MOTION to Strike Portions of the Untimely Supplemental Expert Report of Dr. Gareth Loy and Declarations of Dr. Gareth Loy and Dr. Sigurd Meldal executed by Mark M. Breverman by Apple Inc.. (Matterer, Mary)
June 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 378 SEALED OPENING BRIEF in Support re #377 MOTION to Strike Portions of the Untimely Supplemental Expert Report of Dr. Gareth Loy and Declarations of Dr. Gareth Loy and Dr. Sigurd Meldal filed by Apple Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 7/9/2012. (Matterer, Mary)
June 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 377 MOTION to Strike Portions of the Untimely Supplemental Expert Report of Dr. Gareth Loy and Declarations of Dr. Gareth Loy and Dr. Sigurd Meldal - filed by Apple Inc.. (Matterer, Mary)
June 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 376 SEALED DECLARATION re #375 Brief (Combined Answering and Reply), Second Declaration of Luann L. Simmons in Support of Defendant Apple Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity by Apple Inc.. (Matterer, Mary)
June 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 375 SEALED BRIEF (Combined Answering and Reply) (FILED UNDER SEAL) re #329 MOTION for Summary Judgment [PLAINTIFF MOBILEMEDIA IDEAS LLC'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NO INVALIDITY], #305 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity filed by Apple Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 7/2/2012. (Matterer, Mary) Modified on 6/25/2012 (fms).
June 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 374 REDACTED VERSION of #357 Declaration of Peter C. Toto by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Smith, Rodger)
June 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 373 REDACTED VERSION of #358 Declaration of Lawrence A. Horn by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Smith, Rodger)
June 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 372 REDACTED VERSION of #356 Declaration of Benjamin Adams by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Smith, Rodger)
June 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 371 REDACTED VERSION of #355 Letter to The Honorable Mary Pat Thynge from Jeremy A. Tigan Regarding Discovery Dispute by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Smith, Rodger)
June 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 370 SEALED Letter to The Honorable Mary Pat Thynge from Richard K. Herrmann regarding response to MMI's and Nokia's 6/15/2012 discovery related letters - re #352 Letter, #355 Letter. (Herrmann, Richard)
June 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 369 Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Rodger D. Smith II regarding submission of DVD containing electronic versions of claim construction and summary judgment briefs. (Smith, Rodger)
June 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 368 SEALED DECLARATION re #364 Brief (Combined Answering and Reply),, -- DECLARATION OF DR. TIM A. WILLIAMS, Ph.D. -- by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Smith, Rodger)
June 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 367 SEALED DECLARATION re #364 Brief (Combined Answering and Reply),, -- DECLARATION OF DR. SIGURD MELDAL -- by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Smith, Rodger)
June 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 366 SEALED DECLARATION re #364 Brief (Combined Answering and Reply),, -- DECLARATION OF DR. GARETH LOY DMA -- by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A & B)(Smith, Rodger)
June 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 365 SEALED DECLARATION re #364 Brief (Combined Answering and Reply),, -- DECLARATION OF BRETT J. BLANK -- by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 30)(Smith, Rodger)
June 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 364 SEALED BRIEF (Combined Answering and Reply) FILED UNDER SEAL -- MobileMedia's Opposition to Apple's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement and Reply in Support of MobileMedia's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Appel's Affirmative Defenses of Estoppel, Waiver and Prosecution History Estoppel -- re #300 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Defendant's Affirmative Defenses of Estoppel, Waiver and Prosecution History Estoppel, #328 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement filed by MobileMedia Ideas LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 7/2/2012. (Smith, Rodger) Modified on 6/25/2012 (fms).
June 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 363 SEALED CLAIM CONSTRUCTION REPLY BRIEF re #327 Claim Construction Answering Brief, #303 Claim Construction Opening Brief filed by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit H - K)(Smith, Rodger)
June 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 362 Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Rodger D. Smith II regarding Joint Appendix for Claim Construction Briefing. (Smith, Rodger)
June 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 361 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Standing (Unopposed) - filed by Apple Inc.. (Herrmann, Richard)
June 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 360 NOTICE of filing the following document(s) in paper format: Joint Appendix for Claim Construction Briefing (Volumes 1-7). Original document(s) to be filed with the Clerk's Office. Notice filed by Rodger Dallery Smith, II on behalf of Apple Inc., MobileMedia Ideas LLC (Smith, Rodger)
June 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 359 ORDER Setting Teleconference (Mary Matterer, Esquire to initiate the call): A Telephone Conference is set for 7/30/2012 at 10:00 AM before Judge Mary Pat Thynge to address a discovery issue. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 6/20/2012. (cak)
June 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 358 SEALED DECLARATION re #355 Letter of Lawrence A. Horn by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A through D)(Tigan, Jeremy)
June 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 357 SEALED DECLARATION re #355 Letter of Peter C. Toto by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy)
June 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 356 SEALED DECLARATION re #355 Letter of Benjamin C. Adams by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy)
June 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 355 SEALED Letter to The Honorable Mary Pat Thynge from Jeremy A. Tigan regarding discovery dispute. (Tigan, Jeremy)
June 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 354 SEALED DECLARATION re #352 Letter of Peter C. Toto by Nokia Corporation. (Farnan, Brian)
June 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 353 SEALED DECLARATION re #352 Letter of Benjamin C. Adams by Nokia Corporation. (Farnan, Brian)
June 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 352 SEALED Letter to The Honorable Mary Pat Thynge from Brian E. Farnan regarding Discovery Dispute concerning Non-Party Nokia Corporation. (Farnan, Brian)
June 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 351 REDACTED VERSION of #339 Letter to The Honorable Mary Pat Thynge from Rodger D. Smith II regarding response to Apple's June 5, 2012 letter (D.I. 337) concerning discovery dispute by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy)
June 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 350 REDACTED VERSION of #338 Letter to The Honorable Mary Pat Thynge from Brian E. Farnan regarding Discovery Dispute Concerning Non-Party Nokia Corporation by Nokia Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Farnan, Brian)
June 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 349 REDACTED VERSION of #337 Letter regarding discovery issues by Apple Inc.. (Herrmann, Richard)
June 11, 2012 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER granting #340 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply and the parties are to provide electronic versions on CD with their briefing. Ordered during the teleconference by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 6/11/2012. (fms)
June 11, 2012 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER granting 340 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply and the parties are to provide electronic versions on CD with their briefing. Ordered during the teleconference by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 6/11/2012. (fms)
June 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sue L. Robinson - Telephone Conference held on 6/11/2012 re: Motion for extension of time (D.I. 340). (Court Reporter V. Gunning.) (fms)
June 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 348 REDACTED VERSION of #336 Declaration, [DECLARATION OF DR. TIM A. WILLIAMS, Ph.D. IN SUPPORT OF MOBILEMEDIA IDEAS LLC'S BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO APPLE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INVALIDITY] by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy)
June 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 347 REDACTED VERSION of #335 Declaration, [DECLARATION OF DR. SIGURD MELDAL IN SUPPORT OF MOBILEMEDIA IDEA LLC'S BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO APPLE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INVALIDITY] by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy)
June 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 346 REDACTED VERSION of #334 Declaration, [DECLARATION OF DR. GARETH LOY DMA IN OPPOSITION TO APPLE, INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INVALIDITY OF THE '155 PATENT AND THE '170 PATENT] by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy)
June 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 345 REDACTED VERSION of #333 Declaration, [DECLARATION OF ELIAS SCHILOWITZ IN SUPPORT OF MOBILEMEDIA IDEAS LLC'S OPPOSITION TO APPLE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INVALIDITY AND IN SUPPORT OF MOBILEMEDI A'S CROSS-MOTION OF NO INVALIDITY by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1 through 19, #2 Exhibits 20 through 48)(Tigan, Jeremy)
June 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 344 REDACTED VERSION of #332 Brief (Combined Opening and Answering),, MobileMedia Ideas LLCs Brief in Opposition to Apples Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity and in Support of MobileMedias Cross-Motion of No Invalidity by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy)
June 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 343 REDACTED VERSION of #331 Declaration, executed by Luann L. Simmons by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Part 2, #2 Part 3, #3 Part 4)(Matterer, Mary)
June 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 342 REDACTED VERSION of #330 Brief (Combined Opening and Answering), in Support of Apple's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement and Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Apple's Affirmative Defenses of Estoppel, Waiver and Prosecution History Estoppel by Apple Inc.. (Matterer, Mary)
June 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 341 REDACTED VERSION of #327 Claim Construction Answering Brief by Apple Inc.. (Matterer, Mary)
June 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Set Hearings: A Telephone Conference is set for 6/11/2012 at 11:00 AM before Judge Sue L. Robinson to be coordinated and initiated by counsel for MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (fms) Modified on 6/11/2012 (fms).
June 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mary Pat Thynge - Telephone Conference held on 6/7/2012; The transcipt shall serve as the order of the court. (Court Reporter Valerie Gunning.) (kjk)
June 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 340 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #225 Stipulation, #17 Proposed Order - filed by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tigan, Jeremy)
June 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 339 SEALED Letter to The Honorable Mary Pat Thynge from Rodger D. Smith II regarding response to Apple's June 5, 2012 letter (D.I. 337) concerning discovery dispute - re #337 Letter. (Smith, Rodger)
June 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 338 SEALED Letter to The Honorable Mary Pat Thynge from Brian E. Farnan regarding Discovery Dispute Concerning Non-Party Nokia Corporation. (Farnan, Brian)
June 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 337 SEALED Letter to The Honorable Mary Pat Thynge from Richard K. Herrmann regarding Discovery Dispute. (Herrmann, Richard)
June 5, 2012 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: Help Desk added SEALED prefix to the following docket entries: DI 327, 330 and 332. (rbe)
June 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 336 SEALED DECLARATION re #332 Brief (Combined Opening and Answering), [DECLARATION OF DR. TIM A. WILLIAMS, Ph.D. IN SUPPORT OF MOBILEMEDIA IDEAS LLC'S BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO APPLE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INVALIDITY] by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy)
June 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 335 SEALED DECLARATION re #332 Brief (Combined Opening and Answering), [DECLARATION OF DR. SIGURD MELDAL IN SUPPORT OF MOBILEMEDIA IDEA LLC'S BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO APPLE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INVALIDITY] by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy)
June 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 334 SEALED DECLARATION re #332 Brief (Combined Opening and Answering), [DECLARATION OF DR. GARETH LOY DMA IN OPPOSITION TO APPLE, INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INVALIDITY OF THE '155 PATENT AND THE '170 PATENT] by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy)
June 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 333 SEALED DECLARATION re #332 Brief (Combined Opening and Answering), [DECLARATION OF ELIAS SCHILOWITZ IN SUPPORT OF MOBILEMEDIA IDEAS LLC'S OPPOSITION TO APPLE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INVALIDITY AND IN SUPPORT OF MOBILEMEDIA'S CROSS-MOTION OF NO INVALIDITY (with SEALED Exhibits 1-48)] by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy)
June 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 332 SEALED BRIEF (Combined Opening and Answering) [HIGHLY CONFIDENTIAL -- ATTORNEYS' EYES ONLY -- FILED UNDER SEAL] (with Exhibit A) re #329 MOTION for Summary Judgment [PLAINTIFF MOBILEMEDIA IDEAS LLC'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NO INVALIDITY], #305 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity filed by MobileMedia Ideas LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 6/21/2012. Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 6/14/2012. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 6/5/2012 (rbe).
June 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 331 SEALED DECLARATION re #327 Claim Construction Answering Brief, #330 Brief (Combined Opening and Answering), #328 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement executed by Luann L. Simmons by Apple Inc.. (Matterer, Mary)
June 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 330 SEALED BRIEF (Combined Opening and Answering) re #300 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Defendant's Affirmative Defenses of Estoppel, Waiver and Prosecution History Estoppel, #328 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement filed by Apple Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 6/21/2012. Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 6/14/2012. (Matterer, Mary) Modified on 6/5/2012 (rbe).
June 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 329 MOTION for Summary Judgment [PLAINTIFF MOBILEMEDIA IDEAS LLC'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NO INVALIDITY] - filed by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tigan, Jeremy)
June 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 328 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement - filed by Apple Inc.. (Matterer, Mary)
June 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 327 SEALED CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ANSWERING BRIEF re #303 Claim Construction Opening Brief filed by Apple Inc. (Matterer, Mary) Modified on 6/5/2012 (rbe).
June 1, 2012 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #314 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Exchange of Lists of Fact Witnesses to be Called at Trial; Exchange of Rebuttal Fact Witnesses to be Called at Trial; and Deadline to Depose Disclosed Trial Witnesses to August 13, 2012; September 10, 2012; and October filed by Apple Inc., MobileMedia Ideas LLC. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 6/1/2012. (fms)
June 1, 2012 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 314 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Exchange of Lists of Fact Witnesses to be Called at Trial; Exchange of Rebuttal Fact Witnesses to be Called at Trial; and Deadline to Depose Disclosed Trial Witnesses to August 13, 2012; September 10, 2012; and October filed by Apple Inc., MobileMedia Ideas LLC. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 6/1/2012. (fms)
May 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 326 REDACTED VERSION of #324 Amended Document - Public version of Corrected Declaration of Luann Simmons in Support of Apple Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Part 2, #2 Part 3, #3 Part 4, #4 Part 5, #5 Part 6, #6 Part 7)(Herrmann, Richard)
May 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 325 REDACTED VERSION of #323 Amended Document - Public Version of Corrected Opening Brief in Support of Apple Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity by Apple Inc.. (Herrmann, Richard)
May 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 324 SEALED AMENDED DOCUMENT by Apple Inc.. Amendment to #307 Declaration of Luann L. Simmons in Support of Apple Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity (FILED UNDER SEAL). (Herrmann, Richard) Modified on 5/29/2012 (fms).
May 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 323 SEALED AMENDED DOCUMENT by Apple Inc.. Amendment to #306 Opening Brief in Support of Apple Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity (FILED UNDER SEAL). (Herrmann, Richard) Modified on 5/29/2012 (fms).
May 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 322 Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Richard K. Herrmann regarding corrections to summary judgment briefing - re #307 Declaration, #306 Opening Brief in Support. (Herrmann, Richard)
May 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 321 ORDER re #181 MOTION to Stay respect to U.S. Patent Nos. 6,253,075, RE 39231, 6,070,068, and 7,349,012 Pending Reexaminations filed by Apple Inc. It is hereby ordered that the Motion is withdrawn. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 5/23/2012. (fms)
May 24, 2012 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED denying #313 MOTION for Leave to File to File Reply in Support of Objections to U.S. Magistrate Judge Thynge's Order Regarding Use of Source Code filed by Apple Inc.. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 5/24/2012. (fms)
May 24, 2012 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED denying 313 MOTION for Leave to File to File Reply in Support of Objections to U.S. Magistrate Judge Thynge's Order Regarding Use of Source Code filed by Apple Inc.. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 5/24/2012. (fms)
May 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 320 REDACTED VERSION of #304 Appendix [EXHIBITS TO MOBILEMEDIA IDEAS LLC'S OPENING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF] by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy)
May 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 319 REDACTED VERSION of #303 Claim Construction Opening Brief [MOBILEMEDIA IDEAS LLC'S OPENING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF] by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Attachments: #1 Part 2 of 2)(Tigan, Jeremy)
May 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 318 REDACTED VERSION of #299 Declaration [DECLARATION OF BRETT J. BLANK] by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-7)(Tigan, Jeremy)
May 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 317 REDACTED VERSION of #298 Respone to Objections [MOBILEMEDIA'S RESPONSE TO APPLE'S OBJECTIONS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE] by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy)
May 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 316 (THIS HAS BEEN AMENDED - SEE D.I. 326) REDACTED VERSION of #307 Declaration of Luann Simmons in Support of Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Part 1, #2 Exhibit Part 2, #3 Exhibit Part 3, #4 Exhibit Part 4, #5 Exhibit Part 5, #6 Exhibit Part 6)(Matterer, Mary) Modified on 6/1/2012 (fms).
May 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 315 (THIS HAS BEEN AMENDED - SEE D.I. 325) REDACTED VERSION of #306 Opening Brief in Support Motion for Summary Judgment by Apple Inc.. (Matterer, Mary) Modified on 6/1/2012 (fms).
May 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 314 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Exchange of Lists of Fact Witnesses to be Called at Trial; Exchange of Rebuttal Fact Witnesses to be Called at Trial; and Deadline to Depose Disclosed Trial Witnesses to August 13, 2012; September 10, 2012; and October 12, 2012 - filed by Apple Inc., MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Smith, Rodger)
May 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 313 MOTION for Leave to File to File Reply in Support of Objections to U.S. Magistrate Judge Thynge's Order Regarding Use of Source Code - filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Reply in Support of Objections)(Herrmann, Richard)
May 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 312 STATEMENT re #288 Objections - Certification Regarding Objections to U.S. Magistrate Judge Thynge's Orders Regarding Use of Source Code by Apple Inc.. (Herrmann, Richard)
May 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 311 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Motion by Apple Inc. re #181 MOTION to Stay respect to U.S. Patent Nos. 6,253,075, RE 39231, 6,070,068, and 7,349,012 Pending Reexaminations (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Herrmann, Richard)
May 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 310 Joint MOTION for Teleconference to Resolve Discovery Dispute - filed by Apple Inc., MobileMedia Ideas LLC. Motions referred to Mary Pat Thynge.(Herrmann, Richard)
May 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 309 ORDER Setting Teleconference (Richard Herrmann, Esquire to initiate the call): A Telephone Conference is set for 6/7/2012 at 02:30 PM before Judge Mary Pat Thynge to address discovery issues. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 5/17/2012. (cak)
May 17, 2012 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #308 Stipulation to Extend Page Limit for Appendices filed by Apple Inc., MobileMedia Ideas LLC. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 5/17/2012. (fms)
May 17, 2012 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 308 Stipulation to Extend Page Limit for Appendices filed by Apple Inc., MobileMedia Ideas LLC. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 5/17/2012. (fms)
May 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 308 STIPULATION to Extend Page Limit for Appendices by Apple Inc., MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Herrmann, Richard)
May 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 307 (THIS HAS BEEN AMENDED - SEE D.I. 324) SEALED DECLARATION re #305 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity executed by Luann L. Simmons by Apple Inc.. (Matterer, Mary) Modified on 6/1/2012 (fms).
May 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 306 (THIS HAS BEEN AMENDED - SEE D.I. 323) SEALED OPENING BRIEF in Support re #305 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity filed by Apple Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 6/1/2012. (Matterer, Mary) Modified on 6/1/2012 (fms).
May 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 305 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity - filed by Apple Inc.. (Matterer, Mary)
May 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 304 SEALED APPENDIX re #303 Claim Construction Opening Brief by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy)
May 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 303 SEALED CLAIM CONSTRUCTION OPENING BRIEF filed by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy)
May 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 302 DECLARATION re #300 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Defendant's Affirmative Defenses of Estoppel, Waiver and Prosecution History Estoppel, #301 Opening Brief in Support, Of Jamie Crystal-Lowry by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-4)(Tigan, Jeremy)
May 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 301 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #300 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Defendant's Affirmative Defenses of Estoppel, Waiver and Prosecution History Estoppel filed by MobileMedia Ideas LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 6/1/2012. (Tigan, Jeremy)
May 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 300 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Defendant's Affirmative Defenses of Estoppel, Waiver and Prosecution History Estoppel - filed by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy)
May 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 299 SEALED DECLARATION re #298 Respone to Objections Of Brett J. Blank by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-7)(Tigan, Jeremy)
May 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 298 SEALED RESPONSE TO OBJECTIONS by MobileMedia Ideas LLC re #288 Objections to Magistrate Judge Thynge's Memorandum and Order Regarding Source Code -- CONFIDENTIAL - FILED UNDER SEAL. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 5/15/2012 (fms).
May 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 297 REDACTED VERSION of #293 Declaration of Jon Y. Chow in Support of Apple's Reply in Support of its Motion to Strike by Apple Inc.. (Herrmann, Richard)
May 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 296 REDACTED VERSION of #292 Reply Brief Apple's Reply in support of its Motion to Strike MobileMedia's Newly Proposed Claim Construction and Claim Terms by Apple Inc.. (Herrmann, Richard)
May 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 295 REDACTED VERSION of #275 Declaration of Jeremy A. Tigan (with Exhibits A-I) by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Tigan, Jeremy)
May 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 294 REDACTED VERSION of #274 Answering Brief in Opposition, MobileMedia Ideas, LLC's Newly Proposed Claim Constructions and Claim Terms by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy)
May 4, 2012 Opinion or Order REDACTION NOTICE: In accordance with section G of the Administrative Procedures Governing Filing and Service by Electronic Means, redacted versions of sealed documents shall be filed electronically within 7 days of the filing of the sealed document. The records of this case do not reflect the filing of a redacted version of DI #s 274, 275. (fms)
May 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 293 SEALED DECLARATION re #292 Reply Brief DECLARATION OF JON Y. CHOW (with SEALED Exhibits 1-9) by Apple Inc.. (Herrmann, Richard)
May 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 292 SEALED REPLY BRIEF re #265 MOTION to Strike MobileMedia Ideas, LLC's Newly Proposed Claim Constructions and Claim Terms filed by Apple Inc.. (Herrmann, Richard)
May 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 291 Official Transcript of telephone conference held on March 2, 2012 before Judge Thynge. Court Reporter/Transcriber Heather Triozzi,Telephone number 302-658-6697. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/23/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/4/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/31/2012. (vjg)
May 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 290 Official Transcript of telephone conference held on December 22, 2011 before Judge Thynge. Court Reporter/Transcriber Valerie Gunning,Telephone number (302) 573-6194. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/23/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/4/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/31/2012. (vjg) Modified on 5/2/2012 (fms).
April 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 289 DECLARATION re #288 Objections to U.S. Magistrate Judge Thynge's Orders Regarding Use of Source Code executed by Michael Sapoznikow by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1 - 5, #2 Exhibits 6 - 7)(Herrmann, Richard)
April 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 288 OBJECTIONS by Apple Inc. to #276 SO ORDERED, #267 Memorandum and Order,, of U.S. Magistrate Judge Thynge Regarding Use of Source Code. (Herrmann, Richard)
April 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 287 SO ORDERED re #283 MOTION to Take Deposition of Kenzo Akagiri on June 6, 2012 and June 7, 2012 filed by Apple Inc. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 4/24/2012. (cak)
April 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 286 STIPULATION to Extend Page Limits for Claim Construction and Summary Judgment Briefing by Apple Inc., MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Herrmann, Richard)
April 24, 2012 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #286 Stipulation to Extend Page Limits for Claim Construction and Summary Judgment Briefing filed by Apple Inc., MobileMedia Ideas LLC, Set Briefing Schedule: re #265 MOTION to Strike MobileMedia Ideas, LLC's Newly Proposed Claim Constructions and Claim Terms. (Reply Brief due 5/3/2012.). Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 4/24/2012. (fms)
April 24, 2012 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 286 Stipulation to Extend Page Limits for Claim Construction and Summary Judgment Briefing filed by Apple Inc., MobileMedia Ideas LLC, Set Briefing Schedule: re 265 MOTION to Strike MobileMedia Ideas, LLC's Newly Proposed Claim Constructions and Claim Terms. (Reply Brief due 5/3/2012.). Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 4/24/2012. (fms)
April 24, 2012 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: Replaced corrected copy of Proposed Order attached to DI 283. (cak)
April 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 285 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Responses to Plaintiff's Subpoena to Jack D. Grimes, Ph.D.; (2) Responses to Plaintiff's Subpoena to Dr. Robert Akl; (3) Responses to Plaintiff's Subpoena to Dr. Ravin Balakrishnan; (4) Responses to Plaintiff's Subpoena to Dr. Cliff Reader; (5) Responses to Plaintiff's Subpoena to Dr. John P.J. Kelly; (6) Responses to Plaintiff's Subpoena to Dr. Michael Braasch; and (7) Responses to Plaintiff's Subpoena to Dr. Henry Lieberman by Apple Inc..(Herrmann, Richard)
April 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 284 DECLARATION re #283 MOTION to Take Deposition of Kenzo Akagiri on June 6, 2012 and June 7, 2012 by Apple Inc.. (Herrmann, Richard)
April 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 283 MOTION to Take Deposition of Kenzo Akagiri on June 6, 2012 and June 7, 2012 - filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Motions referred to Mary Pat Thynge.(Herrmann, Richard) (Attachment 1 replaced on 4/24/2012) (cak).
April 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 282 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Supplemental Expert Report of Dr. Sigurd Meldal by MobileMedia Ideas LLC.(Tigan, Jeremy)
April 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 281 REQUEST for Oral Argument by MobileMedia Ideas LLC re #226 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Lack of Standing. (Tigan, Jeremy)
April 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 280 REDACTED VERSION of #271 Declaration in Support of Apple's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Standing by Apple Inc.. (Herrmann, Richard)
April 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 279 REDACTED VERSION of #270 Reply Brief in Support of Apple's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Standing by Apple Inc.. (Herrmann, Richard)
April 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 278 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Supplemental Expert Report of Dr. Ravin Balakrishnan by Apple Inc..(Herrmann, Richard)
April 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 277 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Apple Inc.'s Notice of Subpoenas to: (1) Sigurd Meldal, Ph.D.; (2) Tim A. Williams, Ph.D.; (3) Phillip Johnson; and (4) Gareth Loy, DMA by Apple Inc..(Herrmann, Richard)
April 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 276 SO ORDERED re #272 Order regarding Apple's source code. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 4/17/2012. (cak)
April 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sue L. Robinson - Status Conference held on 4/17/2012 re: scope of summary judgment and claim construction briefing. Counsel to submit stipulation to the court. (Court Reporter V. Gunning.) (fms)
April 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 275 SEALED DECLARATION re #274 Answering Brief in Opposition, DECLARATION OF JEREMY A. TIGAN (with SEALED Exhibits A-I) by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy)
April 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 274 SEALED ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #265 MOTION to Strike MobileMedia Ideas, LLC's Newly Proposed Claim Constructions and Claim Terms filed by MobileMedia Ideas LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 4/26/2012. (Tigan, Jeremy)
April 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 273 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's Notice of Deposition of Dr. Ravin Balakrishnan by Apple Inc..(Herrmann, Richard)
April 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 272 PROPOSED ORDER Apple's source code re #267 Memorandum and Order,, by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Attachments: #1 Letter to The Honorable Mary Pat Thynge)(Tigan, Jeremy)
April 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 271 SEALED DECLARATION re #270 Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Standing by Apple Inc.. (Herrmann, Richard)
April 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 270 SEALED REPLY BRIEF re #226 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Lack of Standing filed by Apple Inc.. (Herrmann, Richard)
April 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 269 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Dr. Ravin Balakrishnan on April 26, 2012 and April 27, 2012 by MobileMedia Ideas LLC.(Smith, Rodger)
April 12, 2012 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 266 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John C. Stellabotte and Elias Schilowitz of Proskauer Rose LLP filed by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 4/12/2012. (fms)
April 12, 2012 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #266 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John C. Stellabotte and Elias Schilowitz of Proskauer Rose LLP filed by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 4/12/2012. (fms)
April 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 268 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Objections to Plaintiff's Notice of Deposition of Dr. Henry Lieberman, Jack D. Grimes, Ph.D, Dr. Michael Braasch, Dr. John P.J. Kelly, and Dr. Cliff Reader by Apple Inc..(Herrmann, Richard)
April 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 267 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER MMIs final proposed order (D.I. 215) is granted with the following addition to paragraph 2. Should MMI rely on that Apple Source Code for the purposes of determining liability of that accused functionality, it shall provide a supplemental opinion to Apple limited to that Apple Source Code from its previously identified expert(s) including the bases and reasons for that opinion consistent with Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(2)(B) on or before May 1, 2012. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that MMI shall provide an Order for review and signature by the Court consistent with the provisions herein. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 4/11/2012. (cak)
April 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 266 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John C. Stellabotte and Elias Schilowitz of Proskauer Rose LLP - filed by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy)
April 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 265 MOTION to Strike MobileMedia Ideas, LLC's Newly Proposed Claim Constructions and Claim Terms - filed by Apple Inc.. (Herrmann, Richard)
April 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 264 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Supplemental Expert Report of Dr. Gareth Loy DMA on U.S. Patent No. 6,725,155 by MobileMedia Ideas LLC.(Tigan, Jeremy)
April 5, 2012 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #263 Stipulation of Dismissal of Claims and Counterclaims With Respect to U.S. Patent Nos. 6,002,390 and 7,313,647 filed by Apple Inc., MobileMedia Ideas LLC. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 4/5/2012. (fms)
April 5, 2012 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 263 Stipulation of Dismissal of Claims and Counterclaims With Respect to U.S. Patent Nos. 6,002,390 and 7,313,647 filed by Apple Inc., MobileMedia Ideas LLC. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 4/5/2012. (fms)
April 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 263 STIPULATION of Dismissal -- Stipulated Dismissal of Claims and Counterclaims With Respect to U.S. Patent Nos. 6,002,390 and 7,303,647 -- by Apple Inc., MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Smith, Rodger)
April 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 262 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Objections and Responses to Notice of Deposition of Robert Akl by Apple Inc..(Matterer, Mary)
April 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 261 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Tim A. Williams on April 16, 2012 (Amended) by Apple Inc..(Herrmann, Richard)
April 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 260 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Sigurd Meldal on April 23, 2012 (Amended) by Apple Inc..(Herrmann, Richard)
April 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 259 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Philip Johnson on May 9, 2012 (Amended) by Apple Inc..(Herrmann, Richard)
April 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 258 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Gareth Loy on April 12, 2012 (Amended) by Apple Inc..(Herrmann, Richard)
April 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 257 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Supplemental Expert Report of Dr. Robert Akl with Amended Charts by Apple Inc..(Herrmann, Richard)
April 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 256 REDACTED VERSION of #242 Declaration of Justin J. Daniels by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-6)(Tigan, Jeremy)
April 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 255 REDACTED VERSION of #241 Declaration of Lawrence A. Horn by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Fully Redacted))(Tigan, Jeremy)
April 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 254 REDACTED VERSION of #240 Answering Brief in Opposition by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy)
April 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Safraz W. Ishmael,Justin J. Daniels,Steven M. Bauer for MobileMedia Ideas LLC added for electronic noticing. (els)
March 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 253 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Dr. Robert Akl on April 6, 2012 by MobileMedia Ideas LLC.(Tigan, Jeremy)
March 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 252 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Dr. John P. Kelly on May 3, 2012 and May 4, 2012 by MobileMedia Ideas LLC.(Tigan, Jeremy)
March 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 251 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Dr. Cliff Reader on April 24, 2012 by MobileMedia Ideas LLC.(Tigan, Jeremy)
March 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 250 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Dr. Henry Lieberman on April 19, 2012 by MobileMedia Ideas LLC.(Tigan, Jeremy)
March 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 249 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Dr. Ravin Balakrishnan on April 26, 2012 and April 27, 2012 by MobileMedia Ideas LLC.(Tigan, Jeremy)
March 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 248 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Jack D. Grimes, Ph.D. on May 1, 2012 and May 2, 2012 by MobileMedia Ideas LLC.(Tigan, Jeremy)
March 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 247 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Dr. Michael S. Braasch on May 2, 2012 by MobileMedia Ideas LLC.(Tigan, Jeremy)
March 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 246 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by MobileMedia Ideas LLC (Tigan, Jeremy)
March 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 245 ORDER, Setting Hearings( An In-Person Status Conference is set for 4/17/2012 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson). Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 3/29/2012. (nmf)
March 30, 2012 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 243 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Vision Winter, Attorney Xin-Yi Zhou, Attorney Melody Drummond Hansen, Attorney Michael Sapoznikow, Attorney Marc Breverman, and Attorney Jon Chow filed by Apple Inc.. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 3/30/2012. (fms)
March 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Kenneth Rubenstein,Anthony C. Coles for MobileMedia Ideas LLC added for electronic noticing. (dmp, )
March 30, 2012 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #243 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Vision Winter, Attorney Xin-Yi Zhou, Attorney Melody Drummond Hansen, Attorney Michael Sapoznikow, Attorney Marc Breverman, and Attorney Jon Chow filed by Apple Inc.. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 3/30/2012. (fms)
March 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 244 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Garrard R. Beeney, Adam R. Brebner, Victoria A. Coyle, David R. Dehoney, Marc De Leeuw, Taly Dvorkis, Diana G. Iskelov and Jane J. Jaang and the law firm of Sullivan & Cromwell LLP as co-counsel. Reason for request: no longer representing MobileMedia Ideas, LLC. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
March 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 243 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Vision Winter, Attorney Xin-Yi Zhou, Attorney Melody Drummond Hansen, Attorney Michael Sapoznikow, Attorney Marc Breverman, and Attorney Jon Chow - filed by Apple Inc.. (Matterer, Mary)
March 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 242 SEALED DECLARATION re #240 Answering Brief in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Standing -- Declaration of Justin J. Daniels by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-6)(Tigan, Jeremy)
March 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 241 SEALED DECLARATION re #240 Answering Brief in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Standing -- Declaration of Lawrence A. Horn by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Tigan, Jeremy)
March 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 240 SEALED ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #226 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Lack of Standing filed by MobileMedia Ideas LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 4/5/2012. (Tigan, Jeremy)
March 26, 2012 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #238 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kenneth Rubenstein, Anthony C. Coles, Steven M. Bauer, Justin J. Daniels and Safraz W. Ishmael filed by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 3/26/2012. (fms)
March 26, 2012 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 238 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kenneth Rubenstein, Anthony C. Coles, Steven M. Bauer, Justin J. Daniels and Safraz W. Ishmael filed by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 3/26/2012. (fms)
March 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 239 CLAIM Construction Chart by Apple Inc., MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Tigan, Jeremy)
March 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Luann L. Simmons for Apple Inc. added for electronic noticing. (dmp, )
March 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 238 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kenneth Rubenstein, Anthony C. Coles, Steven M. Bauer, Justin J. Daniels and Safraz W. Ishmael - filed by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
March 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 237 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Sigurd Meldal, Ph.D. on April 9, 2012, April 10, 2012 and April 11, 2012 by Apple Inc..(Matterer, Mary)
March 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 236 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Philip Johnson on March 26, 2012 by Apple Inc..(Matterer, Mary)
March 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 235 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Gareth Loy, DMA on April 3, 2012, April 4, 2012 and April 5, 2012 by Apple Inc..(Matterer, Mary)
March 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 234 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Tim A. Williams, Ph.D. on March 28, 2012, March 29, 2012 and March 30, 2012 by Apple Inc..(Matterer, Mary)
March 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Alan Federbush for MobileMedia Ideas LLC added for electronic noticing. (dmp, )
March 20, 2012 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 233 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME filed by Apple Inc., MobileMedia Ideas LLC, Set Briefing Schedule: re 226 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Lack of Standing. (Answering Brief due 3/26/2012., Reply Brief due 4/12/2012.) Joint Claim Construction Statement due 3/23/2012. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 3/20/2012. (fms)
March 20, 2012 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #233 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME filed by Apple Inc., MobileMedia Ideas LLC, Set Briefing Schedule: re #226 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Lack of Standing. (Answering Brief due 3/26/2012., Reply Brief due 4/12/2012.) Joint Claim Construction Statement due 3/23/2012. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 3/20/2012. (fms)
March 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 233 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Joint Claim Construction, MobileMedia's Response to Apple's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Standing, and Apple's Reply In Support of its Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Standing to March 23, 2012, March 26, 2012, and April 12, 2012 - filed by Apple Inc., MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy)
March 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 232 REDACTED VERSION of #228 Declaration of David S. Almeling in Support of Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Standing by Apple Inc.. (Herrmann, Richard)
March 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 231 REDACTED VERSION of #227 Opening Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Standing by Apple Inc.. (Herrmann, Richard)
March 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 230 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Rebuttal Expert Report of Dr. Gareth Loy DMA On Validity Issues; (2) Second Expert Report of Dr. Sigurd Meldal; and (3) First Expert Report of Tim A. Williams, Ph.D. In Response To The Expert Reports Of Dr. Henry Lieberman, Dr. John P.J. Kelly And Dr. Jack D. Grimes Regarding Validity by MobileMedia Ideas LLC.(Smith, Rodger)
March 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 229 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Expert Reports of Robert Akl, Ph.D.; Ravin Balakrishnan, Ph.D.; Michael S. Braasch, Ph.D.; Jack D. Grimes, Ph.D.; John P. J. Kelly, Ph.D.; Henry A. Lieberman. Ph.D.; and Cliff Reader, Ph.D. by Apple Inc..(Herrmann, Richard)
March 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 228 SEALED DECLARATION re #226 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Lack of Standing executed by David S. Almeling by Apple Inc.. (Herrmann, Richard)
March 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 227 SEALED OPENING BRIEF in Support re #226 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Lack of Standing filed by Apple Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 3/19/2012. (Herrmann, Richard)
March 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 226 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Lack of Standing - filed by Apple Inc.. (Herrmann, Richard)
March 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mary Pat Thynge - Telephone Conference held on 3/2/2012; The transcript shall serve as the order of the court. (Court Reporter Heather Triozzi - Hawkins Reporting.) (kjk)
March 1, 2012 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #225 Stipulation filed by Apple Inc., MobileMedia Ideas LLC, ( Discovery due by 5/4/2012., Dispositive Motions due by 5/14/2012., Claim Construction Opening Brief due by 5/14/2012., Claim Construction Answering Brief due by 6/4/2012., Claim Construction Reply Brief due by 6/18/2012., Claim Construction Surreply Brief due by 6/28/2012.) See Stipulation for further details. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 3/1/2012. (fms)
March 1, 2012 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 225 Stipulation filed by Apple Inc., MobileMedia Ideas LLC, ( Discovery due by 5/4/2012., Dispositive Motions due by 5/14/2012., Claim Construction Opening Brief due by 5/14/2012., Claim Construction Answering Brief due by 6/4/2012., Claim Construction Reply Brief due by 6/18/2012., Claim Construction Surreply Brief due by 6/28/2012.) See Stipulation for further details. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 3/1/2012. (fms)
February 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 225 STIPULATION Modifying Certain Deadlines re #17 Proposed Order by Apple Inc., MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Smith, Rodger)
February 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 224 ORDER Setting Teleconference (Pilar Kraman, Esquire to initiate the call): A Telephone Conference is set for 3/2/2012 at 10:00 AM before Judge Mary Pat Thynge. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 2/22/2012. (cak)
February 14, 2012 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 223 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Edward J. DeFranco, Alexander Rudis, Matthew Traupman and Kevin P.B. Johnson filed by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 2/14/2012. (fms)
February 14, 2012 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #223 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Edward J. DeFranco, Alexander Rudis, Matthew Traupman and Kevin P.B. Johnson filed by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 2/14/2012. (fms)
February 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 223 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Edward J. DeFranco, Alexander Rudis, Matthew Traupman and Kevin P.B. Johnson - filed by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
February 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 222 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL re MobileMedia Ideas LLC: Entry of appearance of attorney Jack B. Blumenfeld. Attorney Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP and Shaw Keller LLP terminated. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
February 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 220 Letter to The Honorable Mary Pat Thynge from Pilar G. Kraman on behalf of Plaintiff MobileMedia Ideas LLC regarding deposition of Kenzo Akagiri pursuant to November 29, 2011 teleconference - re #206 Transcript,,. (Attachments: #1 Letter of February 3, 2012 to Counsel)(Kraman, Pilar)
January 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 219 NOTICE of Change of Address by Pilar Gabrielle Kraman (Kraman, Pilar)
January 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 218 Letter to The Honorable Mary Pat Thynge from Pilar G. Kraman regarding Plaintiff MobileMedia Ideas LLC's response to Defendant Apple Inc.'s letter of January 30, 2012 (D.I. 217) - re #217 Letter. (Kraman, Pilar)
January 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 217 Letter to The Honorable Mary Pat Thynge from Richard K. Herrmann regarding Response to MMI's Letter dated January 27th, regading Apple's source code production - re #214 Letter,. (Herrmann, Richard)
January 30, 2012 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: So Ordered for DI 215 was removed from the docket as it was signed in error. (cak)
January 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 216 Letter to The Honorable Mary Pat Thynge from Richard K. Herrmann regarding response to Plaintiff's letter dated January, 27th will be filed - re #215 Proposed Order, #214 Letter,. (Herrmann, Richard)
January 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 215 PROPOSED ORDER regarding Source Code re #214 Letter, by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Kraman, Pilar)
January 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 214 Letter to The Honorable Mary Pat Thynge from Pilar G. Kraman on behalf of Plaintiff MobileMedia Ideas LLC regarding proposed order on source code pursuant to December 22, 2011 telephonic conference - re Telephone Conference. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A and B)(Kraman, Pilar)
January 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 213 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Apple's Expert Report of Robert Akl, Ph.D, Ravin Balakrishnan, Ph.D, Michael S. Braasch, Ph.D, Jack D. Grimes, Ph.D, John P. J. Kelly, Ph.D, Henry A. Lieberman, Ph.D, and Cliff Reader, Ph.D by Apple Inc..(Matterer, Mary)
January 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 212 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Lawrence Horn on January 19, 2012 (Amended Notice) by Apple Inc..(Herrmann, Richard)
December 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mary Pat Thynge - Telephone Conference held on 12/22/2011; The transcript shall serve as the order of the court. (Court Reporter Val Gunning.) (kjk)
December 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER re #207 MOTION for Teleconference to Resolve Discovery Dispute on December 22, 2011 filed by MobileMedia Ideas LLC, the transcript of the 12/22/2011 teleconference of the discussions and rulings on the parties submissions #210 and #209 shall serve as the order of the court in this matter. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 12/22/2011. (cak)
December 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 210 Letter to The Honorable Mary Pat Thynge from Mary Matterer regarding response to Plaintiff's December 20, 2011 discovery dispute letter - re #209 Letter,. (Matterer, Mary)
December 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 209 Letter to The Honorable Mary Pat Thynge from Pilar G. Kraman on behalf of Plaintiff MobileMedia Ideas LLC regarding issues to be presented at December 22, 2011 teleconference - re #208 Order Setting Teleconference. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E)(Kraman, Pilar)
December 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER Setting Teleconference (Pilar Kraman, Esquire to initiate the call): A Telephone Conference is set for 12/22/2011 at 10:00 AM before Judge Mary Pat Thynge to address a discovery dispute. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 12/13/2011. (cak)
December 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 207 MOTION for Teleconference to Resolve Discovery Dispute on December 22, 2011 - filed by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. Motions referred to Mary Pat Thynge.(Kraman, Pilar)
December 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 206 Official Transcript of Telephonic Discovery Dispute held on 11-29-11 before Judge Mary Pat Thynge. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leonard A. Dibbs. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/22/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/3/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/29/2012. (lad)
November 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 205 Official Transcript of Telephonic Discovery Dispute held on 11-21-11 before Judge Mary Pat Thynge. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leonard A. Dibbs. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/21/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/3/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/28/2012. (lad)
November 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER re: #196 motion for a teleconference to resolve a discovery dispute. The transcript of the discussions and rullings during the teleconference of 11/29/2011 shall serve as the Order of the Court in this matter. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 11/30/2011. (cak)
November 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mary Pat Thynge - Telephone Conference held on 11/29/2011; The transcript shall serve as the order of the court. (Court Reporter Len Dibbs.) (kjk)
November 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 203 REPLY BRIEF re #181 MOTION to Stay respect to U.S. Patent Nos. 6,253,075, RE 39231, 6,070,068, and 7,349,012 Pending Reexaminations filed by Apple Inc.. (Matterer, Mary)
November 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 202 NOTICE of of Depositions and Subpoenas for William S. Frommer and Sophie Klym (re-notice) by Apple Inc. (Herrmann, Richard)
November 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 201 Letter to The Honorable Mary Pat Thynge from Pilar G. Kraman regarding plaintiff's response to defendant's November 21, 2011 letter - re #199 Letter. (Kraman, Pilar)
November 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER re #192 MOTION for Teleconference to Resolve Discovery Dispute re #191 Order Setting Teleconference filed by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. The Court having held a teleconference with counsel to address the discovery issues contained in #197 Letter and #198 Letter, It is Ordered that the transcript of the 11/21/2011 teleconference shall serve as the Order of the Court in this matter. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 11/22/2011. (cak)
November 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mary Pat Thynge - Telephone Conference held on 11/21/2011; Deft. shall produce additional source code by 11/28/11; Plaintiff has until 12/12/11 to identify holes in production; Deft. has 3 days to supplement request; The transcript shall serve as the order of the court. (Court Reporter Len Dibbs.) (kjk)
November 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 199 Letter to The Honorable Mary Pat Thynge from Mary Matterer regarding Apple's letter motion to compel - re #195 Order Setting Teleconference. (Matterer, Mary)
November 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 198 Letter to The Honorable Mary Pat Thynge from Mary B. Matterer regarding response to Plaintiff's 11-17-2011 discovery dispute letter - re #197 Letter. (Matterer, Mary)
November 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 197 Letter to The Honorable Mary Pat Thynge from Pilar G. Kraman on behalf of Plaintiff, MobileMedia Ideas LLC, regarding issues to be addressed at November 21, 2011 teleconference - re #191 Order Setting Teleconference. (Kraman, Pilar)
November 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 196 MOTION for Teleconference to Resolve Discovery Dispute - filed by Apple Inc.. Motions referred to Mary Pat Thynge.(Matterer, Mary)
November 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER Setting Teleconference (Mary Matterer to initiate the call): A Telephone Conference is set for 11/29/2011 at 04:00 PM before Judge Mary Pat Thynge to address a discovery issue. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 11/15/2011. (cak)
November 15, 2011 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: The pdf of D.I. #193 has been replaced with a corrected pdf per request of filer. (nmf)
November 15, 2011 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: The pdf of D.I. 193 has been replaced with a corrected pdf per request of filer. (nmf)
November 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 194 DECLARATION re #193 Answering Brief in Opposition, to Motion to Stay - Declaration of Diana Iskelov - by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A and B, #2 Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit D-F)(Kraman, Pilar)
November 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #181 MOTION to Stay respect to U.S. Patent Nos. 6,253,075, RE 39231, 6,070,068, and 7,349,012 Pending Reexaminations filed by MobileMedia Ideas LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 11/28/2011. (Kraman, Pilar) (Main Document 193 replaced on 11/15/2011) (nmf, ).
November 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 192 MOTION for Teleconference to Resolve Discovery Dispute re #191 Order Setting Teleconference - filed by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. Motions referred to Mary Pat Thynge.(Kraman, Pilar)
November 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER Setting Teleconference (Pilar Kraman, Esquire to initiate the call): A Telephone Conference is set for 11/21/2011 at 04:00 PM before Judge Mary Pat Thynge to address a discovery issue. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 11/9/2011. (cak)
November 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 190 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Patrick Murphy on November 16, 2011 by MobileMedia Ideas LLC.(Kraman, Pilar)
November 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 189 NOTICE of Change of Firm Affiliation (John W. Shaw) by MobileMedia Ideas LLC (Kraman, Pilar)
October 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 188 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Fourth Supplemental Objections and Responses to Second Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 8 and 9) by Apple Inc..(Herrmann, Richard)
October 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 187 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Peppino Kim on November 23, 2011 by Apple Inc..(Herrmann, Richard)
October 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 186 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Larry Horn on November 21, 2011 by Apple Inc..(Herrmann, Richard)
October 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 185 NOTICE to Take Deposition of JP Gascon on November 22, 2011 by Apple Inc..(Herrmann, Richard) Modified on 11/1/2011 to correct spelling (dzs, ).
October 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 184 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Responses and Objections to Defendant Apple Inc.'s Fourth Set of Interrogatories (No. 16) and Responses and Objections of Plaintiff Mobile Media Ideas LLC to Defendant Apple Inc.'s First Set of Requests for Admissions (Nos. 1-48) by MobileMedia Ideas LLC.(Kraman, Pilar)
October 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 183 DECLARATION re #182 Opening Brief in Support, in Support of Its Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Reexamination (Declaration of Luann Simmons) by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-F, #2 Exhibits G-I, #3 Exhibits J-K, #4 Exhibits L-S)(Herrmann, Richard)
October 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 182 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #181 MOTION to Stay respect to U.S. Patent Nos. 6,253,075, RE 39231, 6,070,068, and 7,349,012 Pending Reexaminations filed by Apple Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 11/14/2011. (Herrmann, Richard)
October 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 181 MOTION to Stay respect to U.S. Patent Nos. 6,253,075, RE 39231, 6,070,068, and 7,349,012 Pending Reexaminations - filed by Apple Inc.. (Herrmann, Richard)
October 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 180 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Alexis Devane on October 26, 2011 by Apple Inc..(Herrmann, Richard)
October 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 179 NOTICE to Take Deposition of MPEG LA, L.L.C. and Service of Subpoena (Amended) on October 26, 2011 by Apple Inc..(Herrmann, Richard)
October 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 178 NOTICE to Take Deposition of MobileMedia Ideas LLC Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) (Amended) on October 26, 2011 by Apple Inc..(Herrmann, Richard)
October 17, 2011 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #177 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Alan Federbush filed by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 10/17/2011. (fms)
October 17, 2011 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 177 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Alan Federbush filed by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 10/17/2011. (fms)
October 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 177 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Alan Federbush - filed by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Kraman, Pilar)
October 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 176 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Apple Inc.'s Objections to Plaintiff MobileMedia Ideas LLC's Amended Notice of Videotaped Deposition Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 30(b)(6) to Defendant Apple Inc. by Apple Inc..(Matterer, Mary)
October 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 175 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Ben Juang on October 14, 2011 by MobileMedia Ideas LLC.(Keller, Karen)
October 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 174 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Supplemental and Amended Responses and Objections to Apple's Third Set of Interrogatories (No. 15) by MobileMedia Ideas LLC.(Keller, Karen)
October 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 173 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) MobileMedia Ideas LLC's Notice of Videotaped Deposition Of George Williams (2) MobileMedia Ideas LLC's Notice of Videotaped Deposition ot Lee Collins by MobileMedia Ideas LLC.(Keller, Karen)
September 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 172 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) DEFENDANT APPLE INC.S FOURTH SET OF INTERROGATORIES (No. 16) TO PLAINTIFF MOBILE MEDIA IDEAS LLC and (2) DEFENDANT APPLE INC.S FIRST SET OF REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS (Nos. 1-48) TO PLAINTIFF MOBILE MEDIA IDEAS LLC by Apple Inc..(Herrmann, Richard)
September 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 171 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff MobileMedia Ideas LLC's Amended Notice of Videotaped Deposition Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 30(b)(6) to Defendant Apple Inc. by MobileMedia Ideas LLC.(Kraman, Pilar)
September 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 170 NOTICE of Subpoenas by MobileMedia Ideas LLC (Attachments: #1 Subpoena Directed To Best Buy Enterprise Services, Inc., #2 Subpoena Directed To CellCo Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless)(Kraman, Pilar)
September 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 169 NOTICE of (Re-notice) Deposition and Subpoena for Nathan Schulhof by Apple Inc. (Herrmann, Richard)
September 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER Granting #167 MOTION (Unopposed) for the Issuance of Order/Commision Allowing Defendant to Take Depositions in Japan MOTION (Unopposed) for the Issuance of Order/Commision Allowing Defendant to Take Depositions in Japan, filed by Apple Inc.. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 9/22/2011. (nms)
September 22, 2011 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: The PDF for the proposed order found at D.I. 167 has been replaced with an amended version. The signature line has been amended. (nms)
September 22, 2011 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: The PDF for the proposed order found at D.I. #167 has been replaced with an amended version. The signature line has been amended. (nms)
September 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 167 MOTION (Unopposed) for the Issuance of Order/Commision Allowing Defendant to Take Depositions in Japan - filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Motions referred to Mary Pat Thynge.(Matterer, Mary) (Main Document 167 replaced on 9/22/2011) (nms). (Attachment 1 replaced on 9/22/2011) (nms).
September 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Marc De Leeuw,David Dehoney for MobileMedia Ideas LLC added for electronic noticing. (dmp, )
September 15, 2011 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #164 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Marc De Leeuw filed by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 9/15/2011. (fms)
September 15, 2011 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 164 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Marc De Leeuw filed by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 9/15/2011. (fms)
September 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 166 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) MobileMedia Ideas LLC's Notice of Videotaped Deposition of Boris Teksler; (2) MobileMedia Ideas LLC's Notice of Videotaped Deposition of Steve Sinclair; (3) MobileMedia Ideas LLC's Notice of Videotaped Deposition of Michael Tchao; (4) MobileMedia Ideas LLC's Notice of Videotaped Deposition of Stan Ng; (5) MobileMedia Ideas LLC's Notice of Videotaped Deposition Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 30(b)(6) to Defendant Apple Inc. by MobileMedia Ideas LLC.(Kraman, Pilar)
September 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 165 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Deposition and Subpoena for Nathan Schulhof by Apple Inc..(Herrmann, Richard)
September 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 164 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Marc De Leeuw - filed by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Kraman, Pilar)
September 13, 2011 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 154 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David S. Almeling filed by Apple Inc., 156 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David Dehoney filed by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 9/13/2011. (fms)
September 13, 2011 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #154 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David S. Almeling filed by Apple Inc., #156 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David Dehoney filed by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 9/13/2011. (fms)
September 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 163 NOTICE of (Re-Notice) of Deposition and Subpoena for Soon Ko by Apple Inc. (Herrmann, Richard)
September 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 162 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Third Supplemental Responses and Objections to Second Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 8 and 9) by Apple Inc..(Herrmann, Richard)
September 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 161 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Ron Huang on September 30, 2011 (Amended) by MobileMedia Ideas LLC.(Keller, Karen)
September 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 160 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Matthew Klahn on September 22, 2011 by MobileMedia Ideas LLC.(Keller, Karen)
September 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 159 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Eric Allamanche on September 22, 2011 by MobileMedia Ideas LLC.(Keller, Karen)
September 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 158 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Chris Wysocki on September 20, 2011 (Amended) by MobileMedia Ideas LLC.(Keller, Karen)
September 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 157 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Joseph Fisher on September 14, 2011 by MobileMedia Ideas LLC.(Keller, Karen)
September 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 156 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David Dehoney - filed by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Kraman, Pilar)
September 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 155 NOTICE of Subpoenas by MobileMedia Ideas LLC (Attachments: #1 Subpoenas directed to 1) Amazon.com, Inc.; 2) AT&T Inc., and 3) Best Buy Co., Inc.)(Kraman, Pilar)
September 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 154 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David S. Almeling - filed by Apple Inc.. (Herrmann, Richard)
September 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 153 NOTICE of Subpoena by MobileMedia Ideas LLC (Attachments: #1 Subpoena Directed to Verizon)(Kraman, Pilar)
August 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 152 NOTICE to Take Deposition of and Subpoena for John M. Van Ryzin, Andrew Todd Zidel and William S. Frommer on September 12, 2011, September 16, 2011 and October 6, 2011 respectively by Apple Inc..(Herrmann, Richard)
August 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 151 NOTICE to Take Deposition of and Subpoena to John M. Van Ryzin and Jay H. Maioli (Re-Notice) on September 12, 2011 and September 15, 2011 respectively by Apple Inc..(Herrmann, Richard)
August 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 150 NOTICE of Re-Notice of Depositon and Subpoena for Doyle B. Johnson by Apple Inc. (Herrmann, Richard)
August 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 149 NOTICE of Re-notice of Deposition and Subpoena for Peter Douma by Apple Inc. (Herrmann, Richard)
August 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER The transcript of the discussions of the teleconference of 8/8/2011 re: #141 and #142 shall serve as the Order of the Court in this matter. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 8/10/2011. (cak)
August 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 147 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Amended Re-notice of Depositon and Notice of Subpoena for Masanori Omote re #146 Notice of Service by Apple Inc.. Related document: #146 Notice of Service filed by Apple Inc..(Herrmann, Richard)
August 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 146 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Re-notice of Deposition and Notice of Subpoena for Masanori Omote by Apple Inc..(Herrmann, Richard)
August 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 145 NOTICE OF SERVICE of MobileMedia Ideas LLC's Notices of Videotaped Depositions of (1) Eric Albert; (2) Thomas Alsina; (3) Chris Blumenberg; (4) Meriko Borogrove; (5) Gordie Freeman; (6 Stan Jirman; (7) Ken Kocienda; (8) Henri Lamiraux; (9) Steve Lemay; (10) Arun Mathias; (11) Erik Neuenschwander; (12) Greg Novick; (13) Toby Paterson; (14) Kevin Pipal; (15) Brian Sander; (16) Justin Santamaria; (17) Steve Swales; (18) Rolf Toft; and (19) Marcel Van Os by MobileMedia Ideas LLC.(Kraman, Pilar)
August 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 144 NOTICE of Re-notice of Deposition and Subpoena for Ian Hardcastle by Apple Inc. (Herrmann, Richard)
August 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 143 Official Transcript of Teleconference held on 8-8-11 before Judge Mary Pat Thygne. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leonard A. Dibbs. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/29/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/8/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/7/2011. (lad)
August 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mary Pat Thynge - A Telephone Conference regarding a discovery dispute was held on 8/8/2011. (Court Reporter Leonard Dibbs.) (nms)
August 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 142 Letter to The Honorable Mary Pat Thynge from Richard K. Herrmann regarding response to MMI's August 4 discovery dispute letter - re #141 Letter. (Herrmann, Richard)
August 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 141 Letter to The Honorable Mary Pat Thynge from Pilar G. Kraman on behalf of Plaintiff regarding discovery issue to be heard on August 8, 2011 - re #136 Order Setting Teleconference. (Kraman, Pilar)
August 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 140 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Re-Notice of Depositions and Subpoenas for Geoffrey T. Anderson, Soon Ko, Kenneth Mar, Andrew Todd Zidel and Jay H. Maioli by Apple Inc..(Herrmann, Richard)
August 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 139 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel (Michele Sherretta Budicak) by MobileMedia Ideas LLC (Kraman, Pilar)
August 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 138 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's Third Set of Interrogatories by Apple Inc..(Matterer, Mary)
July 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 137 MOTION for Teleconference to Resolve Discovery Dispute re #136 Order Setting Teleconference - filed by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. Motions referred to Mary Pat Thynge.(Kraman, Pilar)
July 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER Setting Teleconference (Pilar Kraman, Esquire to initiate the call): A Telephone Conference is set for 8/8/2011 at 10:00 AM before Judge Mary Pat Thynge to address discovery issues. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 7/29/2011. (cak)
July 28, 2011 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #135 Stipulation filed by Apple Inc., MobileMedia Ideas LLC,Joint Claim Construction Statement due 3/2/2012, Discovery due by 3/23/2012. See Stipulation for further details. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 7/28/11. (fms)
July 28, 2011 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 135 Stipulation filed by Apple Inc., MobileMedia Ideas LLC,Joint Claim Construction Statement due 3/2/2012, Discovery due by 3/23/2012. See Stipulation for further details. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 7/28/11. (fms)
July 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 135 Joint STIPULATION to modify certain deadlines in Scheduling Order re #17 Proposed Order by Apple Inc., MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Kraman, Pilar)
July 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 134 NOTICE of Re-Notice of Depositions and Subpoenas as to John M. Van Ryzin, Geoffrey T. Anderson, Kari-Pekka Wilska and William S. Frommer by Apple Inc. (Herrmann, Richard)
July 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 133 NOTICE of Re-Notice of Depositions and Subpoenas as to Tobi Clinton and Bradley D. Lytle, Oblon Spivak by Apple Inc. (Herrmann, Richard)
July 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Victoria A. Coyle,Taly Dvorkis,Diana Iskelov,Jane Jaang for MobileMedia Ideas LLC added for electronic noticing. (dmp, )
July 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 132 NOTICE of (Re-Notice of) Depositions and Subpoenas to James Janky and Grant Jasmin by Apple Inc. (Herrmann, Richard)
July 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 131 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Responses and Objections to Defendant Apple Inc.'s Notice of Deposition of Plaintiff Mobilemedia Ideas LLC Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) by MobileMedia Ideas LLC.(Kraman, Pilar)
July 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 130 NOTICE of (Re-Notice of) Subpoena to William E. Pelton by Apple Inc. (Herrmann, Richard)
July 14, 2011 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #129 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Diana Iskelov, Attorney Jane J. Jaang, Attorney Taly Dvorkis and Attorney Victoria A. Coyle filed by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 7/14/11. (fms)
July 14, 2011 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 129 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Diana Iskelov, Attorney Jane J. Jaang, Attorney Taly Dvorkis and Attorney Victoria A. Coyle filed by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 7/14/11. (fms)
July 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 129 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Diana Iskelov, Attorney Jane J. Jaang, Attorney Taly Dvorkis and Attorney Victoria A. Coyle - filed by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Kraman, Pilar)
July 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 128 NOTICE of (Re-Notice of) Subpoena to Justin Beghtol by Apple Inc. (Herrmann, Richard)
July 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 127 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Plaintiff's Responses And Objections To Apple's Second Set Of Requests For The Production Of Documents And Things (2) Plaintiff's Responses And Objections To Apple's Third Set Of Interrogatories (NO. 15) by MobileMedia Ideas LLC.(Kraman, Pilar)
July 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 126 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Third Set of Interrogatories by MobileMedia Ideas LLC.(Kraman, Pilar)
June 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 125 NOTICE of Service of Subpoena to Harold T. Fujii by Apple Inc. (Herrmann, Richard)
June 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 124 NOTICE of Re-Notice of Deposition and Subpoena as to Kari Pekka Wilska by Apple Inc. (Herrmann, Richard)
June 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 123 NOTICE of Depositions and Subpoenas as to Tobi Clinton, William S. Frommer, Clarence A. Green, Ian Hardcastle, Doyle B. Johnson, Bradley D. Lytle, Oblon Spivak, Jay Maioli, F. Chau & Associates LLC, William E. Pelton, Alvin Sinderbrand, Dennis Smid, Thomas P. Dowd, Donald S. Dowden, Charles P. Sammut, Harry F. Smith by Apple Inc. (Herrmann, Richard)
June 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 122 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Second Amended and Supplemental Responses and Objections to Apple's First Set of Interrogatories Nos. 1 and 2 by MobileMedia Ideas LLC.(Kraman, Pilar)
June 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 121 NOTICE of Subpoena to Kari-Pekka Wilska by Apple Inc. (Herrmann, Richard)
June 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 120 NOTICE of Re-Notice of Deposition and Subpoena to Justin Beghtol by Apple Inc. (Herrmann, Richard)
June 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 119 NOTICE of First Supplemental Responses and Objections to First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1, 2) by Apple Inc. (Herrmann, Richard)
June 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 118 NOTICE of Depositions and Subpoenas as to Kenneth Mar, Justin Beghtol, Andrew Todd Zidel, Eduardo Sciammarella, Geoffrey T. Anderson, Sophie Klym, James M. Janky, Nathan M. Schulhof, Grant M. Jasmin, Soon Ko, Hiroshi Shirakawa, Peter Douma, and John M. Van Ryzin by Apple Inc. (Herrmann, Richard)
June 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 117 OBJECTIONS by Apple Inc. to MobileMedia Ideas LLC's Notice of Rule 30(b)(6) Depsosition to Apple Inc.. (Herrmann, Richard)
June 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 116 NOTICE to Take Deposition of MobileMedia Ideas LLC on July 12, 2011 by Apple Inc..(Herrmann, Richard)
June 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 115 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Nathan Schulhof on July 28, 2011 by Apple Inc..(Herrmann, Richard)
June 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 114 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Iwami Tsujimura on June 29, 2011 by Apple Inc..(Herrmann, Richard)
June 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 113 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Toshiyuki Masui on June 27, 2011 by Apple Inc..(Herrmann, Richard)
June 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 112 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Andrew Todd Zidel on July 25, 2011 by Apple Inc..(Herrmann, Richard)
June 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 111 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Haruo Oba on June 27, 2011 by Apple Inc..(Herrmann, Richard)
June 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 110 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Hiroshi Shirakawa on July 19, 2011 by Apple Inc..(Herrmann, Richard)
June 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 109 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Kenishi Iida Sudo on July 6, 2011 by Apple Inc..(Herrmann, Richard)
June 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 108 NOTICE to Take Deposition of John M. Van Ryzin on July 8, 2011 by Apple Inc..(Herrmann, Richard)
June 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 107 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Soon Ko on June 30, 2011 by Apple Inc..(Herrmann, Richard)
June 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 106 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Masaaki Akahane on July 26, 2011 by Apple Inc..(Herrmann, Richard)
June 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 105 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Peter Douma on July 11, 2011 by Apple Inc..(Herrmann, Richard)
June 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 104 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Eduardo Sciammarella on July 29, 2011 by Apple Inc..(Herrmann, Richard)
June 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 103 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Sophie Klym on July 26, 2011 by Apple Inc..(Herrmann, Richard)
June 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 102 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Kunihito Sawai on June 30, 2011 by Apple Inc..(Herrmann, Richard)
June 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 101 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Grant Jasmin on July 27, 2011 by Apple Inc..(Herrmann, Richard)
June 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 100 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Geoffrey T. Anderson on July 19, 2011 by Apple Inc..(Herrmann, Richard)
June 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 99 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Yoshiai Inoue on June 28, 2011 by Apple Inc..(Herrmann, Richard)
June 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 98 NOTICE to Take Deposition of James Janky on July 27, 2011 by Apple Inc..(Herrmann, Richard)
June 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 97 NOTICE to Take Deposition of AI Kato on July 15, 2011 by Apple Inc..(Herrmann, Richard)
June 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 96 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Toshihisa Yamamoto on July 12, 2011 by Apple Inc..(Herrmann, Richard)
June 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 95 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Jari Hamalainen on June 30, 2011 by Apple Inc..(Herrmann, Richard)
June 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 94 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Markku Majaniemi on July 6, 2011 by Apple Inc..(Herrmann, Richard)
June 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 93 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Masanori Omote on July 14, 2011 by Apple Inc..(Herrmann, Richard)
June 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 92 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Michihito Nakagawa on June 29, 2011 by Apple Inc..(Herrmann, Richard)
June 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 91 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Kari Laurila on July 5, 2011 by Apple Inc..(Herrmann, Richard)
June 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 90 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Petri Haavisto on July 7, 2011 by Apple Inc..(Herrmann, Richard)
June 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 89 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Hiroshi Yasuda on July 1, 2011 by Apple Inc..(Herrmann, Richard)
June 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 88 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Ken Nakajima on July 5, 2011 by Apple Inc..(Herrmann, Richard)
June 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 87 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Michihiro Kaneko on June 30, 2011 by Apple Inc..(Herrmann, Richard)
June 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 86 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Kyoya Tsutsui on July 6, 2011 by Apple Inc..(Herrmann, Richard)
June 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 85 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Kenzo Akagiri on July 5, 2011 by Apple Inc..(Herrmann, Richard)
June 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 84 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Yasuhiko Kato on July 12, 2011 by Apple Inc..(Herrmann, Richard)
June 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 83 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Morihiko Hayashi on July 20, 2011 by Apple Inc..(Herrmann, Richard)
June 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 82 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Kenichiro Kobayashi on July 13, 2011 by Apple Inc..(Herrmann, Richard)
June 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 81 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Kari-Pekka Wilska on July 15, 2011 by Apple Inc..(Herrmann, Richard)
June 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 80 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Justin Beghtol on July 18, 2011 by Apple Inc..(Herrmann, Richard)
June 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 79 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Yoshikazu Takahashi on July 11, 2011 by Apple Inc..(Herrmann, Richard)
June 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 78 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Mikko Terho on June 29, 2011 by Apple Inc..(Herrmann, Richard)
June 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 77 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Hideki Matsumoto on July 13, 2011 by Apple Inc..(Herrmann, Richard)
June 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 76 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Reijo Paajanen on June 28, 2011 by Apple Inc..(Herrmann, Richard)
June 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 75 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Fukuharu Sudo on July 7, 2011 by Apple Inc..(Herrmann, Richard)
June 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 74 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Masayuki Takezawa on July 11, 2011 by Apple Inc..(Herrmann, Richard)
June 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 73 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Kenneth Mar on July 19, 2011 by Apple Inc..(Herrmann, Richard)
June 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 72 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Yoichi Mizutani on July 14, 2011 by Apple Inc..(Herrmann, Richard)
June 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 71 SUBPOENA Returned Executed as to SCA IPLA HOLDINGS INC. on 05/26/2011 (Haney, Megan)
June 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 70 SUBPOENA Returned Executed as to Nokia Capital Inc. on June 1, 2011 (Herrmann, Richard)
June 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 69 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) Second Set of Requests for Production (Nos. 145-147) and 2) Third Set of Interrogatories (No. 15) by Apple Inc..(Herrmann, Richard)
May 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 68 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoena to Nokia Corporation by Apple Inc..(Herrmann, Richard)
May 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 67 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoena to Nokia Capital Inc. by Apple Inc..(Herrmann, Richard)
May 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 66 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Ron Huang on July 29, 2011 by MobileMedia Ideas LLC.(Kraman, Pilar)
May 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 65 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Tang Yew Tan on July 28, 2011 by MobileMedia Ideas LLC.(Kraman, Pilar)
May 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 64 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Stephen Zadesky on July 27, 2011 by MobileMedia Ideas LLC.(Kraman, Pilar)
May 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 63 NOTICE to Take Deposition of William Stewart on July 25, 2011 by MobileMedia Ideas LLC.(Kraman, Pilar)
May 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 62 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Chris Wysocki on July 22, 2011 by MobileMedia Ideas LLC.(Kraman, Pilar)
May 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 61 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Steve Swales on July 20, 2011 by MobileMedia Ideas LLC.(Kraman, Pilar)
May 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 60 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Justin Santamaria on July 18, 2011 by MobileMedia Ideas LLC.(Kraman, Pilar)
May 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 59 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Greg Novick on July 14, 2011 by MobileMedia Ideas LLC.(Kraman, Pilar)
May 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 58 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Defendant Apple Inc. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 30(b)(6) on July 11, 2011 by MobileMedia Ideas LLC.(Kraman, Pilar)
May 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 57 NOTICE of Deposition and Subpoena to SCA IPLA Holdings Inc. by Apple Inc. (Haney, Megan)
May 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 56 NOTICE of Deposition and Subpoena to Sony Corporation by Apple Inc. (Haney, Megan)
May 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ANSWER to #50 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim [Plaintiff's Reply to Defendant's Counterclaims in Apple Inc.'s First Amended Answer to Complaint and Counterclaims] by MobileMedia Ideas LLC.(Budicak, Michele)
May 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 221 SO ORDERED re #53 Agreed Protective Order filed by Apple Inc., MobileMedia Ideas LLC. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 5/16/2011. (cak) (rbe).
May 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 54 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Second Amended Responses And Objections To Apple's First Set Of Interrogatories by MobileMedia Ideas LLC.(Kraman, Pilar)
May 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 53 PROPOSED ORDER - Agreed Protective Order Regarding the Disclosure and Use of Discovery Materials by Apple Inc., MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Herrmann, Richard)
May 11, 2011 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: Per request of counsel, D.I. 51 has been deleted from the docket. The correct Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks is at D.I. 52. (fms)
May 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 52 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,725,155 B1; 5,490,170;. (Kraman, Pilar)
May 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 50 First Amended ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against MobileMedia Ideas LLC by Apple Inc..(fms)
May 9, 2011 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #45 Stipulation filed by Apple Inc., MobileMedia Ideas LLC (See Stipulation for details). Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 5/9/11. (fms)
May 9, 2011 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 45 Stipulation filed by Apple Inc., MobileMedia Ideas LLC (See Stipulation for details). Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 5/9/11. (fms)
May 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER the transcript of the discussions and rulings during the teleconference of May 6, 2011, shall serve as the Order of the Court in this matter. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 5/6/2011. (cak)
May 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mary Pat Thynge - Telephone Conference regarding a discovery dispute was held on 5/6/2011. (Court Reporter Heather Triozzi (Hawkins Reporting Service)). (nms)
May 6, 2011 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #47 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Eric S. Namrow filed by Apple Inc.. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 5/6/11. (fms)
May 6, 2011 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 47 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Eric S. Namrow filed by Apple Inc.. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 5/6/11. (fms)
May 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 48 Letter to The Honorable Mary Pat Thynge from Michele Sherretta Budicak regarding Plaintiff's response to Defendant's May 4, 2011 letter - re #46 Letter. (Budicak, Michele)
May 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Eric S. Namrow - filed by Apple Inc.. (Herrmann, Richard)
May 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Letter to The Honorable Mary Pat Thynge from Richard K. Herrmann regarding outstanding protective order issue - re #44 Order Setting Teleconference. (Herrmann, Richard)
May 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 45 STIPULATION Agreement as to Defendant's Amended Answer and Counterclaim and Withdrawal of Defendant's Emergency Motion to Extend Date Upon Which Pleadings May Be Amended by Apple Inc., MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Herrmann, Richard)
April 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Order Setting Teleconference: Telephone Conference set for 5/6/2011 at 11:30 AM before Judge Mary Pat Thynge to address discovery issues. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 4/28/2011. (cak)
April 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 43 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoena to FujiFilm U.S.A., Inc. by Apple Inc..(Herrmann, Richard)
March 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 42 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoena to AOL, Inc. by Apple Inc..(Herrmann, Richard)
March 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 41 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoena to RealNetworks, Inc. by Apple Inc..(Herrmann, Richard)
March 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 40 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoena to Audible, Inc. by Apple Inc..(Herrmann, Richard)
March 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 39 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's First Amended Responses and Objections to Apple's First Set of Interrogatories by MobileMedia Ideas LLC.(Budicak, Michele)
March 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 38 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Supplemental Responses and Objections to Second Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 10, 12 and 13) by Apple Inc..(Herrmann, Richard)
March 14, 2011 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 37 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Adam R. Brebner filed by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 3/14/11. (fms)
March 14, 2011 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #37 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Adam R. Brebner filed by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 3/14/11. (fms)
March 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Adam R. Brebner - filed by MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Budicak, Michele)
March 9, 2011 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #36 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for completion of discovery of paper and electronic documents to May 13, 2011 filed by Apple Inc. and MobileMedia Ideas LLC. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 3/9/2011. (cak)
March 9, 2011 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re 36 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for completion of discovery of paper and electronic documents to May 13, 2011 filed by Apple Inc. and MobileMedia Ideas LLC. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 3/9/2011. (cak)
March 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for completion of discovery of paper and electronic documents to May 13, 2011 - filed by Apple Inc., MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Herrmann, Richard)
March 8, 2011 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #34 Stipulation and Order filed by Apple Inc., MobileMedia Ideas LLC extending the time for responses to contention interrogatories. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 3/8/2011. (cak)
March 8, 2011 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re 34 Stipulation and Order filed by Apple Inc., MobileMedia Ideas LLC extending the time for responses to contention interrogatories. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 3/8/2011. (cak)
March 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 35 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintff's Responses and Objections to Apple's Second Set of Interrogatories by MobileMedia Ideas LLC.(Budicak, Michele)
March 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATION regarding timing of responses to contention interrogatories by Apple Inc., MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Herrmann, Richard)
February 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 33 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Responses and Objections to Second Set of Interrogatories by Apple Inc..(Matterer, Mary)
February 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 32 NOTICE to Take Deposition of and Service of Subpoena to MPEG LA, L.C.C. on March 18, 2011 by Apple Inc..(Herrmann, Richard)
February 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 31 NOTICE to Take Deposition of and Service of Subpoena to Nokia, Inc. on March 16, 2011 by Apple Inc..(Herrmann, Richard)
February 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Second Set of Interrogatories (No. 14) to Plaintiff by Apple Inc..(Herrmann, Richard)
February 3, 2011 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #29 Stipulation filed by Apple Inc., MobileMedia Ideas LLC. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 2/3/2011. (cak)
February 3, 2011 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re 29 Stipulation filed by Apple Inc., MobileMedia Ideas LLC. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 2/3/2011. (cak)
February 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATION Regarding Discovery by Apple Inc., MobileMedia Ideas LLC. (Budicak, Michele)
January 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Second Set of Interrogatories by MobileMedia Ideas LLC.(Budicak, Michele)
January 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Please be advised that, on 12/21/10, Judge Robinson promulgated new guidelines for claim construction and summary judgment briefing, available on the guidelines section of the website. The opening claim construction brief date and dispositive motion deadline continue to control under the new regime. Responsive filing dates may no l