Wallach et al v. Eaton Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Tauro Brothers Trucking Company and Mark S. Wallach
Defendant: Daimler Trucks North America LLC, Eaton Corporation, Freightliner LLC, International Truck and Engine Corporation, Kenworth Truck Company, Mack Trucks Inc., Navistar International Corporation, Navistar, Inc., Paccar Inc., Peterbilt Motors Company and Volvo Trucks North America
Case Number: 1:2010cv00260
Filed: March 31, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
Presiding Judge: Sue L Robinson
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2014 Filing 241 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Tauro Brothers Trucking Company, Mark S. Wallach. Amendment to #236 Notice of Service of Subpoena to Giap George Nguyen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 -- Amended Subpoena)(Zeldin, Jessica)
November 5, 2014 Filing 240 NOTICE to Take Deposition of David Louya (individually and on behalf of Volvo Trucks North America and Mack Trucks, Inc.) on November 20, 2014, at 9:30 a.m. filed by Tauro Brothers Trucking Company, Mark S. Wallach.(Zeldin, Jessica)
November 5, 2014 Filing 239 NOTICE to Take Deposition of John Spanke on November 13, 2014 at 8:00 a.m. filed by Tauro Brothers Trucking Company, Mark S. Wallach.(Zeldin, Jessica)
November 5, 2014 Filing 238 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Sandy Cutler on November 19, 2014 at 9:30 a.m. filed by Tauro Brothers Trucking Company, Mark S. Wallach.(Zeldin, Jessica)
November 5, 2014 Filing 237 NOTICE OF SERVICE of James E. Sweetnam filed by Tauro Brothers Trucking Company, Mark S. Wallach. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 -- Subpoena)(Zeldin, Jessica)
November 5, 2014 Filing 236 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Giap George Nguyen filed by Tauro Brothers Trucking Company, Mark S. Wallach. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 -- Subpoena)(Zeldin, Jessica)
November 5, 2014 Filing 235 NOTICE OF SERVICE of David D. Renz filed by Tauro Brothers Trucking Company, Mark S. Wallach. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 -- Subpoena)(Zeldin, Jessica)
November 5, 2014 CORRECTING ENTRY: The pdfs of the Notices of Subpoena found at D.I. Nos. 229, 230 and 231 in Civ. No. 10-260 and D.I. 181, 182, and 183 in Civ. No. 11-9 have been replaced with corrected versions per request of filer. The text has also been corrected. Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00260-SLR, 1:11-cv-00009-SLR(nmfn)
November 4, 2014 Filing 234 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Expert Report of Russell Lamb re #225 Stipulation, #227 Order, Set Hearings,,,, filed by Tauro Brothers Trucking Company, Mark S. Wallach.(Zeldin, Jessica)
November 4, 2014 CORRECTING ENTRY: Per request of filer, attachment 16 (Exhibits 19-32) to D.I. 232 has been removed and replaced with the correct version. (fms)
November 3, 2014 Filing 233 [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re #228 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Tauro Brothers Trucking Company, Mark S. Wallach.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 11/20/2014. (Zeldin, Jessica)
November 3, 2014 Filing 232 [SEALED] DECLARATION by Tauro Brothers Trucking Company, Mark S. Wallach. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, part 1, #2 Exhibit 1, part 2, #3 Exhibit 2, part 1, #4 Exhibit 2, part 2, #5 Exhibit 3 - 6, #6 Exhibit 7 - 9, #7 Exhibit 10, part 1, #8 Exhibit 10, part 2, #9 Exhibit 10, part 3, #10 Exhibit 11 - 16, #11 Exhibit 17, part 1, #12 Exhibit 17, part 2, #13 Exhibit 18, part 1, #14 Exhibit 18, part 2, #15 Exhibit 18, part 3, #16 Exhibit 19 - 32, #17 Exhibit 33 - 38, #18 Exhibit 39 - 40, #19 Exhibit 41, part 1, #20 Exhibit 41, part 2, #21 Exhibit 42, part 1, #22 Exhibit 42, part 2, #23 Exhibit 42, part 3, #24 Exhibit 43, #25 Exhibit 44 - 51, #26 Exhibit 52 - 59, #27 Exhibit 60 - 62, #28 Exhibit 63, part 1, #29 Exhibit 63, part 2, #30 Exhibit 64 - 67, #31 Exhibit 68 - 70, #32 Exhibit 71 - 75)(Zeldin, Jessica) (Attachment 16 replaced on 11/4/2014) (fms).
November 3, 2014 Filing 231 Defendants' Notice of Subpoena Ad Testificandum of Ronald Tauro on November 19, 2014 by Daimler Trucks North America LLC, Freightliner LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sensing, John) (Main Document 231 replaced on 11/5/2014) (nmfn). Modified on 11/5/2014 (nmfn).
November 3, 2014 Filing 230 Defendants' Notice of Subpoena Ad Testificandum of Richard Tauro on November 19, 2014 by Daimler Trucks North America LLC, Freightliner LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sensing, John) (Main Document 230 replaced on 11/5/2014) (nmfn). Modified on 11/5/2014 (nmfn).
November 3, 2014 Filing 229 Defendants' Notice of Subpoena Ad Testificandum of Frank DeJute on November 19, 2014 by Daimler Trucks North America LLC, Freightliner LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sensing, John) (Main Document 229 replaced on 11/5/2014) (nmfn). Modified on 11/5/2014 (nmfn).
November 3, 2014 Filing 228 MOTION to Certify Class - filed by Tauro Brothers Trucking Company, Mark S. Wallach. (Zeldin, Jessica)
October 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ORDER granting (177 in 1:11-cv-00009-SLR), (225 in 1:10-cv-00260-SLR) Stipulation and Proposed Amended Scheduling Order. ORDER, Setting Hearings( An Evidentiary Hearing on the Motion for Class Certification is set for 3/24/2015 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson., An Evidentiary Hearing on the Motion for Class Certification is set for 3/25/2015 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson.) See order for further details. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 10/31/2014. Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00260-SLR, 1:11-cv-00009-SLR(nmfn)
October 29, 2014 Filing 226 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Tauro Brothers Trucking Company's Answers to First Set of Restated Interrogatories from Defendants Daimler Trucks North America LLC and Freightliner LLC to Plaintiff Tauro Brothers Trucking Company re #213 Notice of Service, #197 Notice of Service filed by Tauro Brothers Trucking Company, Mark S. Wallach.(Zeldin, Jessica)
October 28, 2014 CORRECTING ENTRY: The stipulation attached to the 10/27/2014 Letter (D.I. 223) has been removed as an attachment to the letter and docketed using the stipulation code. (fms)
October 28, 2014 Filing 224 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Mark S. Wallach on November 6, 2014 at 9:30 AM filed by Eaton Corporation.(Reid, Donald)
October 27, 2014 Filing 225 STIPULATION and Proposed Amended Scheduling Order. (fms)
October 27, 2014 Filing 223 Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Jessica Zeldin regarding Stipulation And (Proposed) Amended Scheduling Order - re SO ORDERED, Scheduling Order (Zeldin, Jessica) Modified on 10/28/2014 (fms).
October 21, 2014 Filing 222 NOTICE of SUBPOENA - Defendants' Rule 30(b)(6) Notice of Subpoena Ad Testificandum (R&R, Inc. on 11/18/14 at 9:00 a.m.) by Daimler Trucks North America LLC, Freightliner LLC (Attachments: #1 Subpoena, #2 Schedule A)(Sensing, John)
October 8, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #221 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney of Attorney David F. Taylor of Perkins Coie LLC filed by Paccar Inc., Kenworth Truck Company, Peterbilt Motors Company. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 10/8/2014. (fms)
October 7, 2014 Filing 221 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney of Attorney David F. Taylor of Perkins Coie LLC - filed by Kenworth Truck Company, Paccar Inc., Peterbilt Motors Company. (Heisman, James)
October 3, 2014 Filing 220 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoena to Jordan Feiger filed by Tauro Brothers Trucking Company, Mark S. Wallach. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Subpoena t Jordan Feiger)(Zeldin, Jessica)
October 2, 2014 Filing 219 DECLARATION re Discovery Conference by Eaton Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter To The Honorable Sue L. Robinson)(Reid, Donald)
October 2, 2014 Filing 218 DECLARATION re Discovery Conference DECLARATION OF NICHOLAS GRAY by International Truck and Engine Corporation, Navistar International Corporation, Navistar, Inc.. (Farnan, Kelly)
October 2, 2014 Filing 217 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Predator Trucking Company on November 5, 2014 at 9:00 am filed by Daimler Trucks North America LLC, Freightliner LLC. (Attachments: #1 Schedule A, #2 Exhibit A)(Sensing, John)
October 2, 2014 Filing 216 DECLARATION re Discovery Conference held before Judge Sue L. Robinson on 9/23/14/Declaration of Andrew Seiple, Esq. by Paccar Inc.. (Heisman, James)
September 26, 2014 Filing 215 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Performance Transportation Services, Inc. on November 7, 2014 filed by Eaton Corporation.(Reid, Donald)
September 26, 2014 Filing 214 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Mark S. Wallach on November 3, 2014 filed by Eaton Corporation.(Reid, Donald)
September 23, 2014 Filing 213 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Tauro Brothers Trucking Company's Answers to First Set of Interrogatories from Defendants Daimler Trucks North America LLC and Freightliner LLC to Plaintiff Tauro Brothers Trucking Company re #197 Notice of Service filed by Tauro Brothers Trucking Company, Mark S. Wallach.(Zeldin, Jessica)
September 23, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sue L. Robinson - Discovery Conference held on 9/23/2014. (Court Reporter V. Gunning.) Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00260-SLR, 1:11-cv-00009-SLR(nmfn)
September 17, 2014 Set Hearings: A Discovery Conference is set for 9/23/2014 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson. Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00260-SLR, 1:11-cv-00009-SLR(nmfn)
September 17, 2014 Filing 212 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Tauro Brothers Trucking Company, Mark S. Wallach. Amendment to #201 Notice to Take Deposition of Roger Nielsen on Sept. 19, 2014, at 8:30 a.m.. (Zeldin, Jessica)
September 16, 2014 Filing 211 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Tauro Brothers Trucking Company on November 13, 2014 at 9:00 am filed by Daimler Trucks North America LLC, Freightliner LLC. (Attachments: #1 Schedule A)(Sensing, John)
September 16, 2014 Filing 210 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoena duces tecum to Marketing Associates LLC filed by Tauro Brothers Trucking Company, Mark S. Wallach. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 -- Subpoena duces tecum to Marketing Associates LLC, #2 Exhibit Schedule A -- Definitions and Document Requests)(Zeldin, Jessica)
September 12, 2014 Filing 209 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric James Evain on behalf of Kenworth Truck Company, Paccar Inc., Peterbilt Motors Company (Evain, Eric)
September 12, 2014 Filing 208 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Meritor, Inc. on September 18, 2014, at 9:30 a.m. filed by Tauro Brothers Trucking Company, Mark S. Wallach. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Description of Matters on Which Examination is Requested)(Zeldin, Jessica)
September 10, 2014 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Brian Borchard for Navistar International Corporation,Brian Borchard for Navistar International Corporation added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:11-cv-00009-SLR, 1:10-cv-00260-SLR(els)
September 8, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #207 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Brian Borchard filed by Navistar International Corporation, International Truck and Engine Corporation, Navistar, Inc. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 9/8/2014. (fms)
September 8, 2014 Filing 207 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Brian Borchard - filed by International Truck and Engine Corporation, Navistar International Corporation, Navistar, Inc.. (Farnan, Kelly)
September 3, 2014 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Christopher H. Wood for Tauro Brothers Trucking Company added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mas)
September 2, 2014 Filing 206 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Ron Gerhard on September 10, 2014 filed by Tauro Brothers Trucking Company.(Zeldin, Jessica)
September 2, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #205 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christopher Wood filed by Mark S. Wallach, Tauro Brothers Trucking Company. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 9/2/2014. (fms)
August 29, 2014 Filing 205 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christopher Wood - filed by Tauro Brothers Trucking Company, Mark S. Wallach. (Zeldin, Jessica)
August 21, 2014 Filing 204 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoena on Meritor Heavy Vehicle Systems, LLC, Meritor Transmission Corporation and ZF Meritor LLC filed by Tauro Brothers Trucking Company, Mark S. Wallach. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Subpoena to Meritor Entities, #2 Exhibit A -- Description of Matters on Which Examination is Requested)(Zeldin, Jessica)
August 21, 2014 Filing 203 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Paul Barkus on September 18, 2014 at 9:30 a.m. filed by Tauro Brothers Trucking Company, Mark S. Wallach.(Zeldin, Jessica)
August 20, 2014 Filing 202 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Eaton Corporation on September 15, 2014 at 9:30 a.m. filed by Tauro Brothers Trucking Company, Mark S. Wallach. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- Description of Matters on Which Examination is Requested)(Zeldin, Jessica)
August 20, 2014 Filing 201 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Roger Nielsen on September 18, 2014 at 9:30 a.m. filed by Tauro Brothers Trucking Company, Mark S. Wallach.(Zeldin, Jessica)
August 20, 2014 Filing 200 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Greg Sharp on October 9, 2014 at 9:30 a.m. filed by Tauro Brothers Trucking Company, Mark S. Wallach.(Zeldin, Jessica)
August 20, 2014 Filing 199 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Brian Mooers on September 11, 2014 at 9:30 a.m. filed by Tauro Brothers Trucking Company, Mark S. Wallach.(Zeldin, Jessica)
August 19, 2014 Filing 198 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Jim Stettler on August 29, 2014, at 9:00 a.m. filed by Tauro Brothers Trucking Company, Mark S. Wallach.(Zeldin, Jessica)
August 18, 2014 Filing 197 NOTICE OF SERVICE of First Set of Interrogatories from Defendants Daimler Trucks North America LLC and Freightliner LLC to Plaintiff Tauro Brothers Trucking Company filed by Daimler Trucks North America LLC, Freightliner LLC.(Sensing, John)
August 15, 2014 Filing 196 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Volvo Trucks North America and Mack Trucks Inc. on Sept. 16 and Sept. 18, 2014, respectively filed by Tauro Brothers Trucking Company, Mark S. Wallach. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- Description of Matters on Which Examination is Requested)(Zeldin, Jessica)
August 15, 2014 Filing 195 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoena to Management Marketing Services, Inc. filed by Tauro Brothers Trucking Company, Mark S. Wallach. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Subpoena to Management Marketing Services, Inc., #2 Exhibit A -- Request for Documents pursuant to subpoena)(Zeldin, Jessica)
August 12, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (194 in 1:10-cv-00260-SLR) (145 in 1:11-cv-00009-SLR) Stipulation and Proposed Order Regarding Class Certification Briefing. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 8/12/2014. See stipulation for details and deadlines. Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00260-SLR, 1:11-cv-00009-SLR(fms)
August 12, 2014 Stipulation captioned with 10-260 SLR and 11-09 SLR and docketed only in 11-09 SLR on 8/11/2014 has been docketed in 10-260 SLR. (fms)
August 11, 2014 Filing 194 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Regarding Class Certification Briefing by Daimler Trucks North America LLC, Eaton Corporation, Freightliner LLC, International Truck and Engine Corporation, Kenworth Truck Company, Mack Trucks Inc., Navistar International Corporation, Navistar, Inc., Paccar Inc., Peterbilt Motors Company, Tauro Brothers Trucking Company, Volvo Trucks North America, Mark S. Wallach. (fms)
August 11, 2014 Filing 193 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Navistar International Corporation on September 4, 2014, at 9:30 a.m. filed by Tauro Brothers Trucking Company, Mark S. Wallach. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- Description of matters on which examination is requested)(Zeldin, Jessica)
August 5, 2014 Filing 192 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Steve Gilligan (Navistar) on Sept. 17, 2014, at 9:30 a.m. filed by Tauro Brothers Trucking Company, Mark S. Wallach.(Zeldin, Jessica)
August 5, 2014 Filing 191 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Robert Hera on Aug. 21, 2014, at 9:30 a.m. filed by Tauro Brothers Trucking Company, Mark S. Wallach.(Zeldin, Jessica)
July 28, 2014 The 7/29/2014 discovery conference is cancelled per request of counsel. Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00260-SLR, 1:11-cv-00009-SLR(nmfn)
July 24, 2014 Filing 190 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Daimler Trucks North America, LLC on August 26, 2014 at 9:30 a.m. filed by Tauro Brothers Trucking Company, Mark S. Wallach. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- Description of Matters on Which Examination is Requested)(Zeldin, Jessica)
July 24, 2014 Filing 189 NOTICE to Take Deposition of PACCAR, Inc. on August 25, 2014 at 9:30 a.m. filed by Tauro Brothers Trucking Company, Mark S. Wallach. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- Description of Matters on Which Examination is Requested)(Zeldin, Jessica)
July 23, 2014 Filing 188 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoena duces tecum to Meritor Heavy Vehicle Systems, LLC, Meritor Transmission Corporation, and ZF Meritor LLC with document requests filed by Tauro Brothers Trucking Company, Mark S. Wallach. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 -- Subpoena to Meritor Heavy Vehicle Systems, LLC, Meritor Transmission Corporation, and ZF Meritor LLC)(Zeldin, Jessica)
July 23, 2014 Filing 187 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoena duces tecum to Martin Laabe Associates, Inc. filed by Tauro Brothers Trucking Company, Mark S. Wallach. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 -- Subpoena to Martin Laabe Associates, Inc. with document request)(Zeldin, Jessica)
July 21, 2014 Filing 186 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Gary L. Moore on August 20, 2014, at 9:30 a.m. filed by Tauro Brothers Trucking Company, Mark S. Wallach.(Zeldin, Jessica)
July 16, 2014 Filing 185 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Mark S. Wallach's Answers to Defendant Eaton Corporation's First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff Mark S. Wallach re #178 Notice of Service filed by Tauro Brothers Trucking Company, Mark S. Wallach.(Zeldin, Jessica)
July 9, 2014 Filing 184 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoena to Automotive Market Research Council filed by Tauro Brothers Trucking Company, Mark S. Wallach. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Subpoena)(Zeldin, Jessica)
July 1, 2014 Filing 183 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Tauro Brothers Trucking Company, Mark S. Wallach. Amendment to #165 Notice to Take Deposition, #182 Amended Document (corrected date of deposition). (Zeldin, Jessica)
July 1, 2014 Filing 182 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Tauro Brothers Trucking Company, Mark S. Wallach. Amendment to #165 Notice to Take Deposition of Ken Schlitt. (Zeldin, Jessica)
June 20, 2014 Filing 181 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Selwyn Feaster on July 23, 2014, at 9:30 a.m. filed by Tauro Brothers Trucking Company, Mark S. Wallach.(Zeldin, Jessica)
June 20, 2014 Filing 180 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Paul Lambrecht on July 15, 2014, at 9:30 a.m. filed by Tauro Brothers Trucking Company, Mark S. Wallach.(Zeldin, Jessica)
June 19, 2014 Filing 179 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL re Kenworth Truck Company, Paccar Inc., Peterbilt Motors Company: Entry of appearance of attorney James D. Heisman. Attorney Francis DiGiovanni and M. Curt Lambert terminated. (Heisman, James)
June 12, 2014 Filing 178 NOTICE OF SERVICE of First Set Of Interrogatories To Plaintiff Mark S. Wallach filed by Eaton Corporation.(Reid, Donald)
June 9, 2014 Filing 177 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Tauro Brothers Trucking Company, Mark S. Wallach. Amendment to #173 Notice to Take Deposition of Robert Reichard on June 12, 2014, at 8:30 a.m.. (Zeldin, Jessica)
June 9, 2014 Filing 176 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Tauro Brothers Trucking Company, Mark S. Wallach. Amendment to #172 Notice to Take Deposition of Carlos Billingsly on June 11, 2014, at 8:30 a.m.. (Zeldin, Jessica)
June 2, 2014 Filing 175 NOTICE to Take Deposition of James Jensen on July 16, 2014 at 9:30 a.m. filed by Tauro Brothers Trucking Company, Mark S. Wallach.(Zeldin, Jessica)
June 2, 2014 Filing 174 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Debbie Shust on June 26, 2014 at 9:30 a.m. filed by Tauro Brothers Trucking Company, Mark S. Wallach.(Zeldin, Jessica)
May 30, 2014 Filing 173 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Robert Reichard on June 12, 2014, at 9:30 a.m. filed by Tauro Brothers Trucking Company, Mark S. Wallach.(Zeldin, Jessica)
May 30, 2014 Filing 172 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Carlos Billingsly on June 11, 2014, at 9:30 a.m. filed by Tauro Brothers Trucking Company, Mark S. Wallach.(Zeldin, Jessica)
May 28, 2014 Filing 171 NOTICE of Change of Law Firm Affiliation by Kenworth Truck Company, Paccar Inc., Peterbilt Motors Company, Kenworth Truck Co. (DiGiovanni, Francis)
May 28, 2014 Filing 170 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Tauro Brothers Trucking Company, Mark S. Wallach. Amendment to #167 Notice to Take Deposition of Keith Harrington on May 30, 2014. (Zeldin, Jessica)
May 28, 2014 Filing 169 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Tauro Brothers Trucking Company, Mark S. Wallach. Amendment to #166 Notice to Take Deposition of Joe Richie on May 29, 2014. (Zeldin, Jessica)
May 16, 2014 Filing 168 NOTICE OF SERVICE of DEFENDANTS VOLVO TRUCKS NORTH AMERICA AND MACK TRUCKS, INC.'S OBJECTIONS AND SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSES TO DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO ALL OEM DEFENDANTS filed by Mack Trucks Inc., Volvo Trucks North America. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Levine, James Harry)
May 15, 2014 Filing 167 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Keith Harrington on May 30, 2014 at 9:30 a.m. filed by Tauro Brothers Trucking Company, Mark S. Wallach.(Zeldin, Jessica)
May 15, 2014 Filing 166 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Joe Richie on May 29, 2014 at 8:30 a.m. filed by Tauro Brothers Trucking Company, Mark S. Wallach.(Zeldin, Jessica)
May 15, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #162 SECOND AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Case referred to the Magistrate Judge for the purpose of exploring ADR. ( Discovery due by 7/17/2015., A Discovery Conference is set for 7/29/2014 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson., An Oral Argument re: motion for class certification is set for 2/27/2015 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson.), A Status Conference is set for 6/24/2015 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson, Dispositive Motions due by 7/17/2015., An Oral Argument is set for 11/10/2015 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson., A Final Pretrial Conference is set for 12/10/2015 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson., A Jury Trial is set for 2/8/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson.. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 5/14/2014. (nmfn)
May 14, 2014 Filing 165 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Ken Schlitt (PACCAR Inc.) on July 10, 2014 at 9:30 a.m. filed by Tauro Brothers Trucking Company, Mark S. Wallach.(Zeldin, Jessica)
May 14, 2014 Filing 164 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Karl Mowat (PACCAR Inc.) on June 19, 2014 at 9:30 a.m. filed by Tauro Brothers Trucking Company, Mark S. Wallach.(Zeldin, Jessica)
May 13, 2014 Filing 163 NOTICE OF SERVICE of DEFENDANTS PACCAR INC., KENWORTH TRUCK COMPANY, AND PETERBILT MOTORS COMPANYS AMENDED OBJECTIONS AND RESPONSES TO DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO ALL OEM DEFENDANTS filed by Kenworth Truck Company, Paccar Inc., Peterbilt Motors Company.(DiGiovanni, Francis)
May 12, 2014 Filing 162 STIPULATED PROPOSED SECOND AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER. (fms)
May 12, 2014 The proposed amended scheduling order attached to D.I. #161 has been removed as an attachment to the letter and docketed using the proposed order docketing event. (fms)
May 12, 2014 Filing 161 Letter to Judge Sue L. Robinson from Jessica Zeldin regarding enclosing stipulated amended scheduling order per telephonic conference of 5-12-2014 - re #158 Order Setting Scheduling Conference. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Amended Scheduling Order)(Zeldin, Jessica)
May 12, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sue L. Robinson - Scheduling Conference held on 5/12/2014. (Court Reporter not present.) Counsel to submit the final revised proposed scheduling order to the court. Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00260-SLR, 1:11-cv-00009-SLR(nmfn)
May 7, 2014 Filing 160 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Notice of Deposition of Thomas Sokach filed by Tauro Brothers Trucking Company, Mark S. Wallach.(Zeldin, Jessica)
May 1, 2014 Filing 159 NOTICE of Appearance by James Harry Stone Levine on behalf of Mack Trucks Inc., Volvo Trucks North America (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Levine, James Harry)
April 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 158 Order Setting Telephonic Scheduling Conference: A Scheduling Conference is set for 5/12/2014 at 10:00 AM before Judge Sue L. Robinson. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 4/25/2014. Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00260-SLR, 1:11-cv-00009-SLR(nmfn)
April 18, 2014 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Christopher T. Heffelfinger for Tauro Brothers Trucking Company added for electronic noticing. (els)
April 17, 2014 Filing 157 Letter to Judge Sue L. Robinson from Jessica Zeldin regarding Stipulated (Proposed) Second Amended Scheduling Order - re SO ORDERED, Scheduling Order,,,,. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Stipulated (Proposed) Second Scheduling Order)(Zeldin, Jessica)
April 3, 2014 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Matthew Ruan for Mark S. Wallach added for electronic noticing. (els)
April 2, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #156 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christopher T. Heffelfinger filed by Mark S. Wallach, Tauro Brothers Trucking Company. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 4/2/2014. (fms)
April 2, 2014 Filing 156 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christopher T. Heffelfinger - filed by Tauro Brothers Trucking Company, Mark S. Wallach. (Zeldin, Jessica)
April 2, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #155 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Matthew W. Ruan filed by Mark S. Wallach, Tauro Brothers Trucking Company. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 4/1/2014. (fms)
April 1, 2014 Filing 155 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Matthew W. Ruan - filed by Tauro Brothers Trucking Company, Mark S. Wallach. (Zeldin, Jessica)
March 28, 2014 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Eric J. Weiss,Catherine S. Simonsen for Paccar Inc. added for electronic noticing. (els)
March 26, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #154 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Eric J. Weiss and Catherine S. Simonsen filed by Paccar Inc., Kenworth Truck Company, Peterbilt Motors Company. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 3/26/2014. (fms)
March 26, 2014 Filing 154 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Eric J. Weiss and Catherine S. Simonsen - filed by Kenworth Truck Company, Paccar Inc., Peterbilt Motors Company. (DiGiovanni, Francis)
March 25, 2014 CORRECTING ENTRY: The correct Notice of Service has been attached at D.I. 153 and the docket text has been corrected to reflect the documents served.(fms)
March 20, 2014 Filing 153 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Objections and Responses to Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories to All OEM Defendants filed by Navistar International Corporation, Navistar, Inc..(Farnan, Kelly) (Main Document 153 replaced on 3/25/2014) (fms). Modified on 3/25/2014 (fms).
March 10, 2014 Filing 152 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Objections and Responses to Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories to All OEM Defendants re #144 Notice of Service filed by Daimler Trucks North America LLC, Freightliner LLC.(Sensing, John)
March 10, 2014 Filing 151 NOTICE of SERVICE OF OBJECTIONS AND RESPONSES TO DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO ALL OEM DEFENDANTS by Mack Trucks Inc., Volvo Trucks North America (Grant, M.)
March 10, 2014 Filing 150 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants PACCAR Inc., Kenworth Truck Company, and Peterbilt Motors Companys Objections and Responses to Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs First Set of Interrogatories to All OEM Defendants filed by Kenworth Truck Company, Paccar Inc., Peterbilt Motors Company.(DiGiovanni, Francis)
February 28, 2014 Filing 149 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Second Set of Requests for Production of Documents to OEM Defendants re #116 Notice of Service filed by Tauro Brothers Trucking Company, Mark S. Wallach.(Zeldin, Jessica)
February 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER Setting Teleconference: A Telephone Conference is set with counsel for Plaintiffs for 3/24/2014 at 10:00 AM before Judge Christopher J. Burke. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 2/27/2014. (dlk)
February 12, 2014 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Julie B. Rubenstein for Eaton Corporation,Julie B. Rubenstein for Eaton Corporation added for electronic noticing. Associated Cases: 1:11-cv-00009-SLR, 1:10-cv-00260-SLR(els)
February 11, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #147 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Julie B. Rubenstein filed by Eaton Corporation. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 2/11/2014. (fms)
February 11, 2014 Filing 147 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Julie B. Rubenstein - filed by Eaton Corporation. (Reid, Donald)
February 11, 2014 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Cori G. Moore for Paccar Inc. added for electronic noticing. (dmp, )
February 11, 2014 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Thomas L. Boeder for Paccar Inc. added for electronic noticing. (dmp, )
February 10, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #145 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Cori Gordon Moore and Thomas L. Boeder filed by Paccar Inc., Kenworth Truck Company, Peterbilt Motors Company. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 2/10/2014. (fms)
February 10, 2014 Filing 146 NOTICE of Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel by Kenworth Truck Company, Paccar Inc., Peterbilt Motors Company (DiGiovanni, Francis)
February 10, 2014 Filing 145 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Cori Gordon Moore and Thomas L. Boeder - filed by Kenworth Truck Company, Paccar Inc., Peterbilt Motors Company. (DiGiovanni, Francis)
January 31, 2014 Filing 144 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories to All OEM Defendants filed by Tauro Brothers Trucking Company, Mark S. Wallach.(Zeldin, Jessica)
January 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER Setting Teleconference: A Telephone Conference is set for 2/10/2014 at 10:15 AM before Judge Christopher J. Burke. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 1/28/2014. (dlk)
January 13, 2014 The discovery conference scheduled for today at 4:30 p.m. is cancelled per request of counsel. Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00260-SLR, 1:11-cv-00009-SLR(nmfn)
January 10, 2014 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Gabriel V. Celii for Mark S. Wallach added for electronic noticing. (dmp, )
January 9, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #142 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Gabriel Celii filed by Mark S. Wallach, Tauro Brothers Trucking Company. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 1/9/2014. (fms)
January 9, 2014 Filing 142 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Gabrel Celii - filed by Tauro Brothers Trucking Company, Mark S. Wallach. (Zeldin, Jessica)
January 7, 2014 Filing 141 SUBPOENA Returned Executed as to Richard Tauro on December 12, 2013 (Sensing, John)
January 7, 2014 Filing 140 SUBPOENA Returned Executed as to Kathryn Tauro on December 12, 2013 (Sensing, John)
January 7, 2014 Filing 139 SUBPOENA Returned Executed as to Gina Larney on December 22, 2013 (Sensing, John)
December 18, 2013 Filing 138 SUBPOENA Returned Executed as to Predator Trucking Company on December 6, 2013 (Sensing, John)
December 10, 2013 Filing 137 NOTICE of Subpoena to Richard Tauro to Produce Documents, Information, or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action on or before 1-6-14 at 9:00 am by Daimler Trucks North America LLC, Freightliner LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Sensing, John)
December 10, 2013 Filing 136 NOTICE of Subpoena to Kathryn Tauro to Produce Documents, Information, or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action on or before 1-6-14 at 9:00 am by Daimler Trucks North America LLC, Freightliner LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Sensing, John)
December 10, 2013 Filing 135 NOTICE of Subpoena to Gina Larney to Produce Documents, Information, or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action on or before 1-6-14 at 9:00 am by Daimler Trucks North America LLC, Freightliner LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Sensing, John)
November 21, 2013 Filing 134 NOTICE of Subpoena to Predator Trucking Company to Produce Documents, Information, or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action on or before December 13, 2013 at 9:00 am by Daimler Trucks North America LLC, Freightliner LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Sensing, John)
November 18, 2013 Filing 133 SUBPOENA Returned Executed as to R&R, Inc. on November 12, 2013 (Sensing, John)
November 8, 2013 Filing 132 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Daimler Trucks North America LLC, Freightliner LLC. Amendment to #130 Notice (Other) of Subpoena to R&R, Inc. requesting documents be produced by 12-2-13. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Sensing, John)
October 28, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (131 in 1:10-cv-00260-SLR) MOTION for Scheduling Order /Stipulated (Proposed) Amended Scheduling Order, (112 in 1:11-cv-00009-SLR) MOTION for Scheduling Order /Stipulated (Proposed) Amended Scheduling Order SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Discovery due by 12/5/2014., A Discovery Conference is set for 1/13/2014 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson., Dispositive Motions due by 12/12/2014.) SEE ORDERS FOR FURTHER DETAILS. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 10/28/2013. Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00260-SLR, 1:11-cv-00009-SLR(nmfn)
October 23, 2013 Filing 131 MOTION for Scheduling Order /Stipulated (Proposed) Amended Scheduling Order - filed by Mack Trucks Inc., Volvo Trucks North America. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Grant, M.)
October 21, 2013 Filing 130 NOTICE of SUBPOENA to R&R, Inc. by Daimler Trucks North America LLC, Freightliner LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Sensing, John)
October 17, 2013 The discovery conference originally set for 10/22/2013 at 4:30 p.m. has been cancelled per request of counsel. The conference will be rescheduled. Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00260-SLR, 1:11-cv-00009-SLR(nmfn)
September 20, 2013 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER: The Telephone Conference set for 9/23/2013 at 11:30 AM before Judge Christopher J. Burke is cancelled and will be rescheduled for a date to be determined. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 9/20/2013. (dlk)
September 18, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #129 Stipulation Regarding Expert Discovery filed by Kenworth Truck Company, Peterbilt Motors Company, International Truck and Engine Corporation, Eaton Corporation, Navistar, Inc., Volvo Trucks North America, Freightliner LLC, Mark S. Wallach, Tauro Brothers Trucking Company, Daimler Trucks North America LLC, Navistar International Corporation, Paccar Inc., Mack Trucks Inc. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 9/18/2013. (nmfn)
September 13, 2013 Filing 129 STIPULATION and (Proposed Order) Regarding Expert Discovery by Daimler Trucks North America LLC, Eaton Corporation, Freightliner LLC, International Truck and Engine Corporation, Kenworth Truck Company, Mack Trucks Inc., Navistar International Corporation, Navistar, Inc., Paccar Inc., Peterbilt Motors Company, Tauro Brothers Trucking Company, Volvo Trucks North America, Mark S. Wallach. (Zeldin, Jessica)
July 29, 2013 Filing 128 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs, Mark S. Wallach, as Chapter 7 Trustee for the Bankruptcy Estate of Performance Transportation Services, Inc. and Tauro Brothers Trucking Company First Amended Initial Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Federal Rule Civ. P. 26(a)(1) by Tauro Brothers Trucking Company, Mark S. Wallach.(Zeldin, Jessica)
June 25, 2013 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sue L. Robinson - Discovery Conference held on 6/25/2013. (Court Reporter V. Gunning.) Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00260-SLR, 1:11-cv-00009-SLR(nmfn)
June 24, 2013 Filing 127 Joint STATUS REPORT and Conference Agenda by Daimler Trucks North America LLC, Eaton Corporation, Freightliner LLC, International Truck and Engine Corporation, Kenworth Truck Company, Mack Trucks Inc., Navistar International Corporation, Navistar, Inc., Paccar Inc., Peterbilt Motors Company, Tauro Brothers Trucking Company, Volvo Trucks North America, Mark S. Wallach. (Zeldin, Jessica)
June 24, 2013 The 6/25/2013 discovery conference will be held in Courtroom 2A at 3:00 p.m. Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00260-SLR, 1:11-cv-00009-SLR(nmfn)
June 24, 2013 Reset Hearings: The Discovery Conference is reset for 6/25/2013 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson. Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00260-SLR, 1:11-cv-00009-SLR(nmfn)
June 12, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (126 in 1:10-cv-00260-SLR, 108 in 1:11-cv-00009-SLR) Electronic Discovery Protocol Stipulation filed by Navistar International Corporation, International Truck and Engine Corporation, Navistar, Inc.. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 6/12/2013. Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00260-SLR, 1:11-cv-00009-SLR(fms)
June 10, 2013 Filing 126 STIPULATION re: ELECTRONIC DISCOVERY PROTOCOL STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER by International Truck and Engine Corporation, Navistar International Corporation, Navistar, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Farnan, Kelly)
May 24, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #125 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Barak A. Bassman and Michael J. Hartman filed by Mack Trucks Inc., Volvo Trucks North America. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 5/24/2013. (fms)
May 24, 2013 Filing 125 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Barak A. Bassman and Michael J. Hartman - filed by Mack Trucks Inc., Volvo Trucks North America. (Grant, M.)
May 21, 2013 Filing 124 NOTICE OF SERVICE of PACCARs Objections and Responses to Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs First Set of Requests for Production to All OEMs by Kenworth Truck Company, Paccar Inc., Peterbilt Motors Company.(DiGiovanni, Francis)
May 21, 2013 Filing 123 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Eaton Corporation's Objections and Responses To Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' First Set of Document Requests re #116 Notice of Service by Eaton Corporation. Related document: #116 Notice of Service filed by Mark S. Wallach, Tauro Brothers Trucking Company.(Reid, Donald)
May 21, 2013 Filing 122 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Objections and Responses to Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Production to all OEMS by Mack Trucks Inc., Volvo Trucks North America (Grant, M.)
May 21, 2013 Filing 121 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Objections and Responses of Tauro Brothers Trucking Company to Defendants' First Request for the Production of Documents and Other Things and Objections and Responses of Mark S. Wallach, Chapter 7 Trustee for the Bankruptcy Estate of Performance Transportation Services, Inc. to Defendants' First Request for the Production of Documents and Other Things re #115 Notice of Service, #114 Notice of Service by Tauro Brothers Trucking Company, Mark S. Wallach. Related document: #115 Notice of Service filed by Mack Trucks Inc., Volvo Trucks North America, #114 Notice of Service filed by Mack Trucks Inc., Volvo Trucks North America.(Zeldin, Jessica)
May 21, 2013 Filing 120 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Objections and Responses to Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Production to All OEMs re #116 Notice of Service by Daimler Trucks North America LLC, Freightliner LLC. Related document: #116 Notice of Service filed by Mark S. Wallach, Tauro Brothers Trucking Company.(Sensing, John)
May 20, 2013 Filing 119 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Navistar International Corporation and Navistar, Inc.'s Responses to Direct Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Production to all OEMS by Navistar International Corporation, Navistar, Inc..(Farnan, Kelly)
April 30, 2013 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Meaghan Thomas-Kennedy for Paccar Inc. added for electronic noticing. (dmp, )
April 24, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #118 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Meaghan Thomas-Kennedy filed by Paccar Inc., Kenworth Truck Company, Peterbilt Motors Company. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 4/24/2013. (fms)
April 23, 2013 Filing 118 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Meaghan Thomas-Kennedy - filed by Kenworth Truck Company, Paccar Inc., Peterbilt Motors Company. (DiGiovanni, Francis)
April 23, 2013 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Laura Alexander for Tauro Brothers Trucking Company added for electronic noticing. (els)
April 23, 2013 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Daniel H. Silverman for Tauro Brothers Trucking Company added for electronic noticing. (els)
April 18, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #117 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Daniel Silverman and Laura Alexander filed by Mark S. Wallach, Tauro Brothers Trucking Company. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 4/18/2013. (fms)
April 18, 2013 Filing 117 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Daniel Silverman and Laura Alexander - filed by Tauro Brothers Trucking Company, Mark S. Wallach. (Zeldin, Jessica)
April 16, 2013 Filing 116 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Direct Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests of Production to all OEMS and Direct Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Production to Eaton by Tauro Brothers Trucking Company, Mark S. Wallach.(Zeldin, Jessica)
April 16, 2013 Filing 115 NOTICE OF SERVICE of DEFENDANTS FIRST REQUEST FOR THE PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND OTHER THINGS drected to Plaintiff Mark S. Wallach by Mack Trucks Inc., Volvo Trucks North America.(Grant, M.)
April 16, 2013 Filing 114 NOTICE OF SERVICE of DEFENDANTS FIRST REQUEST FOR THE PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND OTHER THINGS directed to Plaintiff Tauro Brothers Trucking Company by Mack Trucks Inc., Volvo Trucks North America.(Grant, M.)
March 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER Setting Teleconference: A Telephone Conference is set for 9/23/2013 at 11:30 AM before Judge Christopher J. Burke. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 3/27/2013. (dlk)
March 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER Setting Teleconference: plaintiffs to initiate the call. A Telephone Conference is set for 11/6/2014 at 04:30 PM before Judge Sue L. Robinson. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 3/13/2013. (nmfn)
March 11, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (111 in 1:10-cv-00260-SLR) STIPULATED COORDINATED CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT AND [PROPOSED] PROTECTIVE ORDER, filed by Kenworth Truck Company, Peterbilt Motors Company, International Truck and Engine Corporation, Eaton Corporation, Volvo Trucks North America, Freightliner LLC, Daimler Trucks North America LLC, Navistar International Corporation, Paccar Inc., Mack Trucks Inc., (85 in 1:11-cv-00009-SLR) STIPULATED COORDINATED CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT AND [PROPOSED] PROTECTIVE ORDER, filed by Peterbilt Motors Company, International Truck and Engine Corporation, Eaton Corporation, Kenworth Truck Co., Freightliner LLC, Navistar International Corporation, Daimler Trucks North America LLC, Paccar Inc., Mack Trucks Inc., Volvo Trucks North America Inc.. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 3/11/2013. Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00260-SLR, 1:11-cv-00009-SLR(fms)
March 11, 2013 Filing 111 Joint PROPOSED ORDER Stipulated Coordinated Confidentiality Agreement and [Proposed] Protective Order by Daimler Trucks North America LLC, Eaton Corporation, Freightliner LLC, International Truck and Engine Corporation, Kenworth Truck Company, Mack Trucks Inc., Navistar International Corporation, Paccar Inc., Peterbilt Motors Company, Volvo Trucks North America. (DiGiovanni, Francis)
March 7, 2013 Pro Hac Vice Attorney John Robert Robertson,Corey W. Roush,Justin W. Bernick,Benjamin F. Holt,Meghan C. Edwards-Ford for Daimler Trucks North America LLC added for electronic noticing. Associated Cases: 1:11-cv-00009-SLR, 1:10-cv-00260-SLR(dmp, )
February 26, 2013 Filing 110 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs, Mark S. Wallach, as Chapter 7 Trustee for the Bankruptcy Estate of Performance Transportation Services, Inc., and Tauro Brothers Trucking Company Initial Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Federal Rule Civ. P. 26(a)(1) by Tauro Brothers Trucking Company, Mark S. Wallach.(Zeldin, Jessica)
February 26, 2013 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Jennifer W. Cowen for Navistar International Corporation added for electronic noticing. (dmp, )
February 25, 2013 Filing 109 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Daimler Trucks North America LLC's Initial Disclosures by Daimler Trucks North America LLC.(Sensing, John)
February 25, 2013 Filing 108 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosure Statement by Eaton Corporation.(Reid, Donald)
February 25, 2013 Filing 107 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Navistar International Corporation and Navistar, Inc., F/K/A International Truck and Engine Corporation's Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(1) by International Truck and Engine Corporation, Navistar International Corporation.(Farnan, Kelly)
February 25, 2013 Filing 106 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosure Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(1) of Defendants Volvo Trucks North America and Mack Trucks, INC. by Mack Trucks Inc., Volvo Trucks North America.(Grant, M.)
February 25, 2013 Filing 105 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosure Statement of Defendant PACCAR, Inc Pursuant to Rule 26(a)(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by Kenworth Truck Company, Paccar Inc., Peterbilt Motors Company.(DiGiovanni, Francis)
February 22, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #104 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jennifer Cowen of Kirkland & Ellis LLP filed by Navistar International Corporation, International Truck and Engine Corporation. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 2/22/2013. (fms)
February 22, 2013 CORRECTING ENTRY: Certification has been attached to D.I. #104 . (fms)
February 22, 2013 Filing 104 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jennifer Cowen of Kirkland & Ellis LLP - filed by International Truck and Engine Corporation, Navistar International Corporation. (Farnan, Kelly) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/22/2013: #1 Certification) (fms).
February 21, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #103 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney J. Robert Robertson, Corey W. Roush, Benjamin F. Holt, Justin W. Bernick, and Meghan C. Edwards-Ford filed by Daimler Trucks North America LLC. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 2/21/2013. (fms)
February 20, 2013 Filing 103 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney J. Robert Robertson, Corey W. Roush, Benjamin F. Holt, Justin W. Bernick, and Meghan C. Edwards-Ford - filed by Daimler Trucks North America LLC. (Horwitz, Richard)
February 20, 2013 Filing 102 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel to Withdraw All Attorneys of the law firm Bingham McCutchen LLP and to Substitute with J. Robert Robertson, Corey W. Roush, Benjamin F. Holt, Justin W. Bernick, and Meghan C. Edwards-Ford of the law firm Hogan Lovells US LLP by Daimler Trucks North America LLC (Horwitz, Richard)
February 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER Setting Teleconference: A Telephone Conference is set for 3/25/2013 at 12:00 PM before Judge Christopher J. Burke to discuss ADR. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 2/19/2013. (dlk)
February 19, 2013 Filing 100 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Richard R. Cook by Kenworth Truck Company, Paccar Inc., Peterbilt Motors Company (DiGiovanni, Francis)
February 11, 2013 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Christopher J. Burke for Mediation. (dlk)
February 11, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #99 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case referred to the Magistrate Judge for the purpose of exploring ADR. ( Joinder of Parties due by 2/1/2014., Amended Pleadings due by 2/1/2014., Discovery due by 11/24/2014., A Discovery Conference is set for 6/25/2013 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson., A 2nd Discovery Conference is set for 10/22/2013 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson. An Oral Argument on the motion for class certification is set for 9/5/2014 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson.) Dispositive Motions due by 11/24/2014., Answering Briefs due 1/23/2015., Reply Briefs due 2/24/2015., An Oral Argument re: summary judgment is set for 3/27/2015 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson., A Final Pretrial Conference is set for 5/14/2015 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson., A Jury Trial is set for 6/1/2015 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 2/11/2013. (nmfn)
February 8, 2013 The proposed scheduling order attached to D.I. #98 has been docketed using the proposed order code. (fms)
February 7, 2013 Filing 99 PROPOSED Scheduling ORDER filed on behalf of all parties. (fms)
February 7, 2013 Filing 98 Letter to Judge Sue L. Robinson from Jessica Zeldin regarding Proposed Scheduling Order - re Scheduling Conference. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Scheduling Order)(Zeldin, Jessica)
January 31, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #97 Proposed Stipulated Confidentiality Agreement and Protective Order, filed by Kenworth Truck Company, Peterbilt Motors Company, International Truck and Engine Corporation, Eaton Corporation, Volvo Trucks North America, Freightliner LLC, Mark S. Wallach, Tauro Brothers Trucking Company, Daimler Trucks North America LLC, Navistar International Corporation, Paccar Inc., Mack Trucks Inc.. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 1/31/2013. (fms)
January 30, 2013 Filing 97 PROPOSED ORDER re Stipulated Confidentiality Agreement and Protective Order by Daimler Trucks North America LLC, Eaton Corporation, Freightliner LLC, International Truck and Engine Corporation, Kenworth Truck Company, Mack Trucks Inc., Navistar International Corporation, Paccar Inc., Peterbilt Motors Company, Tauro Brothers Trucking Company, Volvo Trucks North America, Mark S. Wallach. (Zeldin, Jessica)
January 23, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #96 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Scott M. Edenfield of Kirkland & Ellis LLP filed by Navistar International Corporation, International Truck and Engine Corporation. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 1/23/2013. (fms)
January 15, 2013 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sue L. Robinson - Scheduling Conference held on 1/15/2013. (Court Reporter not present.) Counsel to submit the final proposed scheduling order to the court. (nmfn)
January 14, 2013 Filing 96 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Scott M. Edenfield of Kirkland & Ellis LLP - filed by International Truck and Engine Corporation, Navistar International Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certification by Counsel to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice)(Farnan, Kelly)
January 14, 2013 Filing 95 Letter to Judge Sue L. Robinson from Jessica Zeldin regarding Revised Scheduling Order and Proposed Confidentiality Order - re Set/Reset Hearings. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Revised Proposed Scheduling Order, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Confidentiality Stip and Order)(Zeldin, Jessica)
January 14, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #93 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Todd A. Seaver filed by Mark S. Wallach, Tauro Brothers Trucking Company. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 1/14/2013. (fms)
January 14, 2013 Filing 94 Letter to Judge Sue L. Robinson from Jessica Zeldin regarding Proposed Scheduling Order - re Set/Reset Hearings. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order (Proposed) Scheduling Order)(Zeldin, Jessica)
January 11, 2013 Filing 93 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney - filed by Tauro Brothers Trucking Company, Mark S. Wallach. (Zeldin, Jessica)
January 7, 2013 Filing 92 NOTICE of Firm Name Change by Kenworth Truck Company, Paccar Inc., Peterbilt Motors Company (DiGiovanni, Francis)
December 6, 2012 Reset Hearings: The Scheduling Conference is reset per request of counsel for 1/15/2013 at 09:00 AM before Judge Sue L. Robinson. (nmfn)
November 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 91 Order Setting Telephonic Scheduling Conference: A Scheduling Conference is set for 12/11/2012 at 09:00 AM before Judge Sue L. Robinson. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 11/21/2012. (nmfn)
November 16, 2012 Filing 90 ANSWER to Amended Complaint ANSWER to #25 Amended Complaint, by Eaton Corporation.(Reid, Donald)
October 26, 2012 Filing 89 ANSWER to Amended Complaint ANSWER to #25 Amended Complaint, by Kenworth Truck Company, Paccar Inc., Peterbilt Motors Company.(DiGiovanni, Francis)
October 26, 2012 Filing 88 NOTICE of Appearance by M. Curt Lambert on behalf of Kenworth Truck Company, Paccar Inc., Peterbilt Motors Company (Lambert, M.)
October 26, 2012 Filing 87 ANSWER to Amended Complaint ANSWER to #25 Amended Complaint, by Mack Trucks Inc., Volvo Trucks North America.(Grant, M.)
October 26, 2012 Filing 86 ANSWER to Amended Complaint ANSWER to #25 Amended Complaint, by Daimler Trucks North America LLC.(Horwitz, Richard)
October 26, 2012 Filing 85 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, #25 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand , ANSWER to Amended Complaint ANSWER to #1 Complaint, #25 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand by Navistar International Corporation, Navistar, Inc. F/K/A International Truck and Engine Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Farnan, Kelly) Modified on 10/31/2012 (fms).
October 26, 2012 Filing 84 NOTICE of Appearance by John Anderson Sensing on behalf of Daimler Trucks North America LLC (Sensing, John)
October 24, 2012 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #83 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #25 Amended Complaint, filed by Eaton Corporation, Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Eaton Corporation answer due 11/16/2012. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 10/24/2012. (fms)
October 23, 2012 Filing 83 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #25 Amended Complaint, - filed by Eaton Corporation. (Reid, Donald)
September 26, 2012 Filing 82 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel of Dana K. Severance by Kenworth Truck Company, Paccar Inc., Peterbilt Motors Company (DiGiovanni, Francis)
September 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 81 MEMORANDUM ORDER denying #66 MOTION to Amend/Correct #63 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Failure to State Claim, Defendants Original Equipment Manufacturers' Motion to Amend the Court's September 30, 2011 Order and to Certify it for Interlocutory Appeal, denying #71 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 9/26/2012. (nmfn)
December 14, 2011 Filing 80 REQUEST for Oral Argument by Eaton Corporation re #66 MOTION to Amend/Correct #63 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Failure to State Claim, Defendants Original Equipment Manufacturers' Motion to Amend the Court's September 30, 2011 Order and to Certify it for Interlocutory Appeal Pursuant to 28 U. MOTION to Amend/Correct #63 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Failure to State Claim, Defendants Original Equipment Manufacturers' Motion to Amend the Court's September 30, 2011 Order and to Certify it for Interlocutory Appeal Pursuant to 28 U.. (Reid, Donald)
December 12, 2011 Filing 79 REQUEST for Oral Argument by Daimler Trucks North America LLC, Freightliner LLC, International Truck and Engine Corporation, Kenworth Truck Company, Mack Trucks Inc., Navistar International Corporation, Paccar Inc., Peterbilt Motors Company, Volvo Trucks North America re #66 MOTION to Amend/Correct #63 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Failure to State Claim, Defendants Original Equipment Manufacturers' Motion to Amend the Court's September 30, 2011 Order and to Certify it for Interlocutory Appeal Pursuant to 28 U. MOTION to Amend/Correct #63 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Failure to State Claim, Defendants Original Equipment Manufacturers' Motion to Amend the Court's September 30, 2011 Order and to Certify it for Interlocutory Appeal Pursuant to 28 U.. (Farnan, Kelly)
December 8, 2011 CORRECTING ENTRY: D.I. 78 has been linked to D.I. 71 (Motion). (fms)
December 7, 2011 Filing 78 REPLY BRIEF Defendant Eaton Corporation's Reply Brief In Support Of Its Motion To Amend The September 30, 2011 Order To Include Certification For Interlocutory Appeal Pursuant To 28 U.S.C. Section 1292(B) D.I. #71 filed by Eaton Corporation. (Reid, Donald) Modified on 12/8/2011 (fms).
December 7, 2011 Filing 77 REPLY BRIEF re #66 MOTION to Amend/Correct #63 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Failure to State Claim, Defendants Original Equipment Manufacturers' Motion to Amend the Court's September 30, 2011 Order and to Certify it for Interlocutory Appeal Pursuant to 28 U. MOTION to Amend/Correct #63 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Failure to State Claim, Defendants Original Equipment Manufacturers' Motion to Amend the Court's September 30, 2011 Order and to Certify it for Interlocutory Appeal Pursuant to 28 U. filed by Daimler Trucks North America LLC, Freightliner LLC, International Truck and Engine Corporation, Kenworth Truck Company, Mack Trucks Inc., Navistar International Corporation, Paccar Inc., Peterbilt Motors Company, Volvo Trucks North America. (Farnan, Kelly)
November 28, 2011 Address of law firm Grant & Eisenhofer, P.A., updated per: #76 Notice of Change of Address (rbe)
November 28, 2011 Filing 76 NOTICE of Change of Address by Geoffrey C. Jarvis (Jarvis, Geoffrey)
November 22, 2011 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #75 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to file reply briefs in support of Motions for Certification of Order for Interlocutory Appeal to December 7, 2011 filed by Eaton Corporation, Set Briefing Schedule: re #66 MOTION to Amend/Correct #63 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Failure to State Claim, Defendants Original Equipment Manufacturers' Motion to Amend the Court's September 30, 2011 Order and to Certify it for Interlocutory Appeal Pursuant to 28 U. MOTION to Amend/Correct #71 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability. (Reply Brief due 12/7/2011.). Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 11/22/2011. (fms)
November 22, 2011 Filing 75 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to file reply briefs in support of Motions for Certification of Order for Interlocutory Appeal to December 7, 2011 - filed by Eaton Corporation. (Reid, Donald)
November 15, 2011 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Glen DeValerio for Mark S. Wallach added for electronic noticing. (dmp, )
November 14, 2011 Filing 74 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re D.I. #66 and #71 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability filed by Tauro Brothers Trucking Company, Mark S. Wallach.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 11/28/2011. (Zeldin, Jessica) Modified on 11/22/2011 (fms).
November 9, 2011 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Erik T. Koons for Eaton Corporation added for electronic noticing. (els)
November 2, 2011 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Todd A. Seaver for Mark S. Wallach added for electronic noticing. (dmp, )
October 26, 2011 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #73 Stipulation, filed by Mark S. Wallach, Tauro Brothers Trucking Company, Set Briefing Schedule: re #66 MOTION to Amend/Correct #63 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Failure to State Claim, #71 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability. (Answering Brief due 11/14/2011.) See stipulation for further details. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 10/26/2011. (fms)
October 25, 2011 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Stephen E. Connolly for Tauro Brothers Trucking Company added for electronic noticing. (nms)
October 24, 2011 Filing 73 Joint STIPULATION Granting Plaintiffs Leave to File Omnibus Response to Motions for Certification of Order for Interlocutory Appeal and Setting a Page Limitation and Briefing Schedule for Such Omnibus Response re #63 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Failure to State Claim, by Tauro Brothers Trucking Company, Mark S. Wallach. (Zeldin, Jessica)
October 24, 2011 CORRECTING ENTRY: Per request of filer, D.I. 72 has been replaced with a correct version that corrects an error in the Table of Contents. (fms)
October 21, 2011 Filing 72 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #71 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability filed by Eaton Corporation.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 11/7/2011. (Reid, Donald) (Main Document 72 replaced on 10/24/2011) (fms).
October 21, 2011 Filing 71 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability - filed by Eaton Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reid, Donald)
October 19, 2011 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #70 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Erik T. Koons filed by Eaton Corporation. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 10/19/2011. (fms)
October 19, 2011 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #68 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Glen DeValerio and Todd Seaver filed by Mark S. Wallach. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 10/19/2011. (fms)
October 19, 2011 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #64 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Stephen E. Connolly filed by Mark S. Wallach, Tauro Brothers Trucking Company. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 10/19/2011. (fms)
October 18, 2011 Filing 70 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Erik T. Koons - filed by Eaton Corporation. (Reid, Donald)
October 14, 2011 Filing 69 NOTICE of Change of Address by Jessica Zeldin (Zeldin, Jessica)
October 14, 2011 Filing 68 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Glen DeValerio and Todd Seaver - filed by Mark S. Wallach. (Zeldin, Jessica)
October 14, 2011 CORRECTING ENTRY: D.I. Nos. 68 and 69 did not contain counsel's signature and have been deleted from the docket. Counsel will re-file the motions shortly. (fms)
October 13, 2011 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #65 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for filing any motions to certify this Court's Order (D.I. 63) for interlocutory appeal; the parties further stipulate that Defendants' time to answer the Amended Complaint is hereby extended 30 days from resolution of an interlocutory appeal, if any is granted, or from denial of any request for interlocutory appeal filed by Kenworth Truck Company, Peterbilt Motors Company, International Truck and Engine Corporation, Eaton Corporation, Volvo Trucks North America, Freightliner LLC, Mark S. Wallach, Tauro Brothers Trucking Company, Daimler Trucks North America LLC, Navistar International Corporation, Paccar Inc., Mack Trucks Inc.. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 10/13/2011. (fms)
October 11, 2011 Filing 67 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #66 MOTION to Amend/Correct #63 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Failure to State Claim, Defendants Original Equipment Manufacturers' Motion to Amend the Court's September 30, 2011 Order and to Certify it for Interlocutory Appeal Pursuant to 28 U. MOTION to Amend/Correct #63 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Failure to State Claim, Defendants Original Equipment Manufacturers' Motion to Amend the Court's September 30, 2011 Order and to Certify it for Interlocutory Appeal Pursuant to 28 U. filed by International Truck and Engine Corporation, Navistar International Corporation.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 10/28/2011. (Farnan, Kelly)
October 11, 2011 Filing 66 MOTION to Amend/Correct #63 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Failure to State Claim, Defendants Original Equipment Manufacturers' Motion to Amend the Court's September 30, 2011 Order and to Certify it for Interlocutory Appeal Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) - filed by International Truck and Engine Corporation, Navistar International Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Compliance)(Farnan, Kelly)
October 11, 2011 Filing 65 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for filing any motions to certify this Court's Order (D.I. 63) for interlocutory appeal; the parties further stipulate that Defendants' time to answer the Amended Complaint is hereby extended 30 days from resolution of an interlocutory appeal of the Court's Order (D.I. 63) to October 21, 2011 - filed by Daimler Trucks North America LLC, Eaton Corporation, Freightliner LLC, International Truck and Engine Corporation, Kenworth Truck Company, Mack Trucks Inc., Navistar International Corporation, Paccar Inc., Peterbilt Motors Company, Tauro Brothers Trucking Company, Volvo Trucks North America, Mark S. Wallach. (Reid, Donald)
October 4, 2011 Filing 64 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Stephen E. Connolly - filed by Tauro Brothers Trucking Company, Mark S. Wallach. (Zeldin, Jessica)
October 4, 2011 CORRECTING ENTRY: Page 1 of the memorandum opinion of September 30, 2011 (D.I. #62 ) has been replaced to correct the spelling of the law firm Faruqi & Faruqi, LLP. (nmf)
September 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER denying #34 Motion to Dismiss ; granting #36 Motion to Dismiss the Clayton Act claim (count II) and denying the motion in all other respects. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 9/30/2011. (nmf)
September 30, 2011 Filing 62 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 9/30/2011. (nmf) (Main Document 62 replaced on 10/4/2011) (nmf, ).
September 14, 2011 Filing 61 NOTICE of WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL (W. HARDING DRANE, JR.) by Daimler Trucks North America LLC, Freightliner LLC (Drane, W.)
June 7, 2011 Pro Hac Vice Attorneys Daniel J. Boland and Jeremy Heep for Mack Trucks Inc. added for electronic noticing. (nms)
June 3, 2011 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #60 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jeremy Heep and Daniel J. Boland filed by Mack Trucks Inc., Volvo Trucks North America. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 6/3/11. (fms)
June 2, 2011 Filing 60 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jeremy Heep and Daniel J. Boland - filed by Mack Trucks Inc., Volvo Trucks North America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certification of Jeremy Heep, #2 Exhibit Certification of Daniel J. Boland, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission of Jeremy Heep and Daniel J. Boland, #4 Exhibit Certificate of Service)(Grant, M.)
April 14, 2011 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Leslie S. Garthwaite for International Truck and Engine Corporation and Navistar International Corporation added for electronic noticing. (nms)
April 5, 2011 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #58 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Leslie S. Garthwaite filed by Navistar International Corporation, International Truck and Engine Corporation. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 4/5/11. (fms)
March 30, 2011 Filing 59 NOTICE of Change of Address by Jessica Zeldin (Zeldin, Jessica)
March 30, 2011 Filing 58 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Leslie S. Garthwaite - filed by International Truck and Engine Corporation, Navistar International Corporation. (Farnan, Kelly)
March 25, 2011 Filing 57 NOTICE of Change of Address by Donald E. Reid (Reid, Donald)
March 25, 2011 CORRECTING ENTRY: per request of filer, D.I. 55 Notice has been removed from the docket. Entry will be place on correct docket by filer. (dlk)
March 25, 2011 Filing 56 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Miriam L. Lieberman as co-counsel. Reason for request: withdrawal of appearance. (Farnan, Kelly)
January 4, 2011 STATEMENT re #49 Notice (Other) by Mack Trucks Inc., Volvo Trucks North America. (lid)
January 4, 2011 SO ORDERED- re #54 Proposed Order,, #52 MOTION for Leave to File <. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 1/3/2011. (lid)
January 3, 2011 Filing 54 PROPOSED ORDER Granting Motion for Leave to File Response to Plaintiffs' Citation of Subsequent Authority re #53 Statement, #52 MOTION for Leave to File Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Response to Plaintiffs' Citation of Subsequent Authority by Mack Trucks Inc., Volvo Trucks North America. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Grant, M.)
January 3, 2011 Filing 53 STATEMENT re #52 MOTION for Leave to File Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Response to Plaintiffs' Citation of Subsequent Authority Local Rule 7.1.1 Statement Supporting Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Response to Plaintiffs' Citation of Subsequent Authority by Mack Trucks Inc., Volvo Trucks North America. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Grant, M.)
December 28, 2010 Filing 52 MOTION for Leave to File Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Response to Plaintiffs' Citation of Subsequent Authority - filed by Daimler Trucks North America LLC, Eaton Corporation, Freightliner LLC, International Truck and Engine Corporation, Kenworth Truck Company, Mack Trucks Inc., Navistar International Corporation, Paccar Inc., Peterbilt Motors Company, Volvo Trucks North America, Mark S. Wallach. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Citation of Subsequent Authority, #2 Certificate of Service)(Grant, M.)
December 27, 2010 Filing 51 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Mack Trucks Inc.. (Grant, M.)
December 27, 2010 Filing 50 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Volvo Trucks North America. (Grant, M.)
December 17, 2010 Filing 49 NOTICE of Citation of Subsequent Authority by Mark S. Wallach (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Zeldin, Jessica)
November 24, 2010 Filing 48 REQUEST for Oral Argument by International Truck and Engine Corporation, Navistar International Corporation re #36 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Defendants Original Equipment Manufacturers' Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice All Counts of the First Amended Complaint, #34 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim [Defendant Eaton Corporation's Motion To Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Class Action Complaint]. (Farnan, Kelly)
November 23, 2010 Filing 47 REQUEST for Oral Argument by Mark S. Wallach. (Zeldin, Jessica)
November 19, 2010 Filing 46 REPLY BRIEF re #36 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Defendants Original Equipment Manufacturers' Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice All Counts of the First Amended Complaint DEFENDANTS ORIGINAL EQUIPMENT MANUFACTURERS REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION TO DISMISS filed by International Truck and Engine Corporation, Navistar International Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Farnan, Kelly)
November 19, 2010 Filing 45 REPLY BRIEF re #34 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim [Defendant Eaton Corporation's Motion To Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Class Action Complaint] filed by Eaton Corporation. (Reid, Donald)
October 29, 2010 Filing 44 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #36 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Defendants Original Equipment Manufacturers' Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice All Counts of the First Amended Complaint, #34 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim [Defendant Eaton Corporation's Motion To Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Class Action Complaint] filed by Mark S. Wallach.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 11/8/2010. (Zeldin, Jessica)
October 28, 2010 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #43 Stipulation to Extend Page Limit filed by Mark S. Wallach. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 10/28/2010. (nmf)
October 27, 2010 Filing 43 STIPULATION To extend the page limit for Plaintiffs' Response to Motion to Dismiss by Mark S. Wallach. (Zeldin, Jessica)
October 19, 2010 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Scott W. Carlson for Tauro Brothers Trucking Company added for electronic noticing. (els)
October 18, 2010 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Vincent J. Esades for Tauro Brothers Trucking Company added for electronic noticing. (nms)
October 7, 2010 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #42 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Vincent J. Esades, Esquire and Scott W. Carlson, Esquire. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 10/7/2010. (lid)
September 30, 2010 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #40 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Robert G. Eisler and Shelly Friedland. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 9/30/2010. (lid)
September 29, 2010 Filing 42 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Vincent J. Esades, Esquire and Scott W. Carlson, Esquire of Heins Mills & Olson, P.L.C. to represent plaintiff Tauro Brothers Trucking Company - filed by Tauro Brothers Trucking Company, Mark S. Wallach. (deLeeuw, Peter)
September 23, 2010 Filing 41 REDACTED VERSION of #37 Opening Brief in Support, by International Truck and Engine Corporation, Navistar International Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-6)(Farnan, Kelly)
September 21, 2010 Pro Hac Vice Attorney William C. Lavery for Eaton Corporation added for electronic noticing. (nms)
September 21, 2010 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Joseph A. Ostoyich for Eaton Corporation added for electronic noticing. (nms)
September 20, 2010 Filing 40 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Robert G. Eisler and Shelly Friedland - filed by Tauro Brothers Trucking Company. (Jarvis, Geoffrey)
September 20, 2010 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Geoffrey C. Jarvis on behalf of Tauro Brothers Trucking Company (Jarvis, Geoffrey)
September 17, 2010 Filing 38 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by International Truck and Engine Corporation, Navistar International Corporation. (Farnan, Kelly)
September 17, 2010 Filing 37 SEALED OPENING BRIEF in Support re #36 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Defendants Original Equipment Manufacturers' Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice All Counts of the First Amended Complaint FILED UNDER SEAL - DEFENDANTS ORIGINAL EQUIPMENT MANUFACTURERS' OPENING BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION TO DISMISS filed by International Truck and Engine Corporation, Navistar International Corporation.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 10/4/2010. (Farnan, Kelly)
September 17, 2010 Filing 36 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Defendants Original Equipment Manufacturers' Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice All Counts of the First Amended Complaint - filed by International Truck and Engine Corporation, Navistar International Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Farnan, Kelly)
September 17, 2010 Filing 35 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #34 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim [Defendant Eaton Corporation's Motion To Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Class Action Complaint] filed by Eaton Corporation.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 10/4/2010. (Reid, Donald)
September 17, 2010 Filing 34 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim [Defendant Eaton Corporation's Motion To Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Class Action Complaint] - filed by Eaton Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit [proposed] Order)(Reid, Donald)
September 16, 2010 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #33 STIPULATION Extending Page Limit.. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 9/16/2010. (lid)
September 14, 2010 Filing 33 STIPULATION Extending Page Limit for Motions to Dismiss by Daimler Trucks North America LLC, Eaton Corporation, Freightliner LLC, International Truck and Engine Corporation, Kenworth Truck Company, Mack Trucks Inc., Navistar International Corporation, Paccar Inc., Peterbilt Motors Company, Tauro Brothers Trucking Company, Volvo Trucks North America, Mark S. Wallach. (Farnan, Kelly)
August 20, 2010 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #32 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Joseph A. Ostoyich, Andrew D. Lazerow and William C. Lavery. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 8/20/2010. (lid)
August 16, 2010 Filing 32 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Joseph A. Ostoyich, Andrew D. Lazerow and William C. Lavery - filed by Eaton Corporation. (Reid, Donald)
August 5, 2010 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #31 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME. Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Daimler Trucks North America LLC answer due 9/17/2010; Eaton Corporation answer due 9/17/2010; Freightliner LLC answer due 9/17/2010; International Truck and Engine Corporation answer due 9/17/2010; Kenworth Truck Company answer due 9/17/2010; Mack Trucks Inc. answer due 9/17/2010; Navistar International Corporation answer due 9/17/2010; Paccar Inc. answer due 9/17/2010; Peterbilt Motors Company answer due 9/17/2010; Volvo Trucks North America answer due 9/17/2010. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 8/5/2010. (lid)
August 2, 2010 Filing 31 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants to answer the Amended Complaint to September 17, 2010; for Plaintiffs to respond to Defendants' motions to dismiss to October 29, 2010; and for Defendants to reply to Plaintiffs' response to motions to dismiss to November 19, 2010 to - filed by International Truck and Engine Corporation, Navistar International Corporation. (Farnan, Kelly)
July 26, 2010 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #26 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Peter Kohn, Esquire, #27 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Brett Cebulash, Esquire and Barry Taus, Esquire, #28 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Richard A. Koffman, Esquire; Benjamin D. Brown, Esquire and Emmy L. Levens, Esquire. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 7/22/2010. (lid)
July 23, 2010 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #30 Proposed Pretrial Order filed by Mark S. Wallach, Tauro Brothers Trucking Company. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 7/23/2010. (nmf)
July 21, 2010 Filing 30 Proposed Pretrial Order No. 1 (Unopposed) by Tauro Brothers Trucking Company, Mark S. Wallach. (Zeldin, Jessica)
July 21, 2010 CORRECTING ENTRY: Docket clerk deleted proposed order attached to D.I. 29 due to document being filed improperly. Counsel is advised to re-file document separately using the PROPOSED ORDER event code. (lid) Modified on 7/21/2010 (lid).
July 20, 2010 Filing 29 Letter to Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Jessica Zeldin regarding (proposed) Pretrial Order No. 1 - unopposed. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order (Proposed) Pretrial Order No. 1)(Zeldin, Jessica)
July 19, 2010 Filing 28 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Richard A. Koffman, Esquire; Benjamin D. Brown, Esquire and Emmy L. Levens, Esquire of Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC - filed by Tauro Brothers Trucking Company, Mark S. Wallach. (Zeldin, Jessica)
July 19, 2010 Filing 27 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Brett Cebulash, Esquire and Barry Taus, Esquire of Taus, Cebulash & Landau, LLP - filed by Tauro Brothers Trucking Company, Mark S. Wallach. (Zeldin, Jessica)
July 19, 2010 Filing 26 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Peter Kohn, Esquire of Faruqi & Faruqi, LLP - filed by Tauro Brothers Trucking Company, Mark S. Wallach. (Zeldin, Jessica)
July 16, 2010 Filing 25 AMENDED COMPLAINT (CLASS ACTION) against Daimler Trucks North America LLC, Eaton Corporation, Freightliner LLC, International Truck and Engine Corporation, Kenworth Truck Company, Mack Trucks Inc., Navistar International Corporation, Paccar Inc., Peterbilt Motors Company, Volvo Trucks North America- filed by Mark S. Wallach, Tauro Brothers Trucking Company.(Zeldin, Jessica)
July 1, 2010 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #24 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney James H. Mutchnik, Daniel E. Laytin, Andrew Paul Bautista and Miriam Lauren Lieberman. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 7/1/2010. (lid)
June 29, 2010 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #23 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer complaint to through and including 45 days after Plaintiff files his amended complaint. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 6/29/2010. (lid)
June 25, 2010 Remark: Per request to Help Desk, ECF noticing activated for attorney Donald E. Reid, who represents defendant Eaton Corporation. (rbe)
June 24, 2010 Filing 24 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney James H. Mutchnik, Daniel E. Laytin, Andrew Paul Bautista and Miriam Lauren Lieberman - filed by International Truck and Engine Corporation, Navistar International Corporation. (Farnan, Kelly)
June 23, 2010 Filing 23 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer complaint to through and including 45 days after Plaintiff files his amended complaint - filed by International Truck and Engine Corporation, Navistar International Corporation. (Farnan, Kelly)
June 17, 2010 Filing 22 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Lisa A. Schmidt, Kelly E. Farnan and Richards, Layton & Finger, P.A. on behalf of by International Truck and Engine Corporation, Navistar International Corporation (Farnan, Kelly)
June 10, 2010 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #21 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Manuel J. Dominguez, Esquire; Kyle G. DeValerio, Esquire and Marc J. Greenspon, Esquire. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 6/10/2010. (lid)
June 4, 2010 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #19 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Daniel L. Goldberg Daniel S. Savrin and Gregory F. Wells. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 6/4/2010. (lid)
June 2, 2010 Filing 21 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Manuel J. Dominguez, Esquire; Kyle G. DeValerio, Esquire and Marc J. Greenspon, Esquire of Berman DeValerio - filed by Mark S. Wallach. (Zeldin, Jessica)
May 26, 2010 Filing 20 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Daimler Trucks North America LLC, Freightliner LLC identifying Corporate Parent Daimler Trucks North America LLC for Daimler Trucks North America LLC, Freightliner LLC.. (Drane, W.)
May 25, 2010 Filing 19 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Daniel L. Goldberg Daniel S. Savrin and Gregory F. Wells of Bingham McCutchen LLP - filed by Daimler Trucks North America LLC, Freightliner LLC. (Drane, W.)
May 25, 2010 Filing 18 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of W. Harding Drane, Jr. and Richard L. Horwitz of Potter Anderson & Corroon LLP by Daimler Trucks North America LLC, Freightliner LLC (Drane, W.)
May 24, 2010 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #16 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney James C. Egan, Carrie M. Anderson, and Robin Cook. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 5/24/2010. (lid)
May 11, 2010 Filing 17 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Kenworth Truck Company, Paccar Inc., Peterbilt Motors Company. (DiGiovanni, Francis)
May 11, 2010 Filing 16 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney James C. Egan, Carrie M. Anderson, and Robin Cook - filed by Kenworth Truck Company, Paccar Inc., Peterbilt Motors Company. (DiGiovanni, Francis)
May 11, 2010 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Dana Kathryn Hammond on behalf of Kenworth Truck Company, Paccar Inc., Peterbilt Motors Company (Hammond, Dana)
May 11, 2010 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Francis DiGiovanni on behalf of Kenworth Truck Company, Paccar Inc., Peterbilt Motors Company (DiGiovanni, Francis)
April 30, 2010 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED,- re #13 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME, #12 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME. Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Daimler Trucks North America LLC answer due 6/28/2010; Eaton Corporation answer due 6/28/2010; Freightliner LLC answer due 6/28/2010; International Truck and Engine Corporation answer due 6/28/2010; Kenworth Truck Company answer due 6/28/2010; Mack Trucks Inc. answer due 6/28/2010; Navistar International Corporation answer due 6/28/2010; Paccar Inc. answer due 6/28/2010; Peterbilt Motors Company answer due 6/28/2010; Volvo Trucks North America answer due 6/28/2010. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 4/29/2010. (lid)
April 29, 2010 Filing 13 Joint STIPULATION to extend time to answer, plead or otherwise respond to Complaint to and including June 28, 2010 re #1 Complaint, by Daimler Trucks North America LLC, Freightliner LLC. (Drane, W.)
April 28, 2010 Filing 12 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants Eaton Corporation, Volvo Trucks North America, Mack Trucks, Inc., Navistar International Corporation, International Truck and Engine Corporation, Paccar Inc., Kenworth Truck Company and Peterbilt Motors Company to June 28, 2010 - filed by Eaton Corporation. (Reid, Donald)
April 20, 2010 Filing 11 Return of Service Executed by Mark S. Wallach. Peterbilt Motors Company served on 4/16/2010, answer due 5/7/2010. (deLeeuw, Peter)
April 20, 2010 Filing 10 Return of Service Executed by Mark S. Wallach. International Truck and Engine Corporation served on 4/15/2010, answer due 5/6/2010. (deLeeuw, Peter)
April 20, 2010 Filing 9 Return of Service Executed by Mark S. Wallach. Kenworth Truck Company served on 4/15/2010, answer due 5/6/2010. (deLeeuw, Peter)
April 12, 2010 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mark S. Wallach. Volvo Trucks North America served on 4/9/2010, answer due 4/30/2010. (deLeeuw, Peter)
April 9, 2010 Summons Issued as to International Truck and Engine Corporation on 4/9/2010; Kenworth Truck Company on 4/9/2010; Peterbilt Motors Company on 4/9/2010. (rwc)
April 9, 2010 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mark S. Wallach. Paccar Inc. served on 4/8/2010, answer due 4/29/2010. (deLeeuw, Peter)
April 9, 2010 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mark S. Wallach. Eaton Corporation served on 4/8/2010, answer due 4/29/2010. (deLeeuw, Peter)
April 9, 2010 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mark S. Wallach. Mack Trucks Inc. served on 4/8/2010, answer due 4/29/2010. (deLeeuw, Peter)
April 9, 2010 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mark S. Wallach. Navistar International Corporation served on 4/8/2010, answer due 4/29/2010. (deLeeuw, Peter)
April 9, 2010 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mark S. Wallach. Daimler Trucks North America LLC served on 4/8/2010, answer due 4/29/2010. (deLeeuw, Peter)
April 8, 2010 Summons Issued as to Volvo Trucks North America on 4/8/2010. (fms)
April 8, 2010 Summons Issued as to Daimler Trucks North America LLC on 4/8/2010; Eaton Corporation on 4/8/2010; Mack Trucks Inc. on 4/8/2010; Navistar International Corporation on 4/8/2010; Paccar Inc. on 4/8/2010. (dzs, )
April 7, 2010 Case assigned to Judge Sue L. Robinson. Please include the initials of the Judge (SLR) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
March 31, 2010 No Summons Issued (dzs, )
March 31, 2010 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction (dzs, )
March 31, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Daimler Trucks North America LLC, Eaton Corporation, Freightliner LLC, International Truck and Engine Corporation, Kenworth Truck Company, Mack Trucks Inc., Navistar International Corporation, Paccar Inc., Peterbilt Motors Company, Volvo Trucks North America - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0311-714753.) - filed by Mark S. Wallach. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dzs, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wallach et al v. Eaton Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tauro Brothers Trucking Company
Represented By: Laura Alexander
Represented By: Benjamin D. Brown
Represented By: Scott W. Carlson
Represented By: Brett Cebulash
Represented By: Stephen E. Connolly
Represented By: Vincent J. Esades
Represented By: Christopher T. Heffelfinger
Represented By: Geoffrey C. Jarvis
Represented By: Richard A. Koffman
Represented By: Emmy L. Levens
Represented By: Daniel H. Silverman
Represented By: Barry Taus
Represented By: Christopher H. Wood
Represented By: Jessica Zeldin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark S. Wallach
Represented By: Brett Cebulash
Represented By: Barry Taus
Represented By: Jessica Zeldin
Represented By: Gabriel V. Celii
Represented By: Glen DeValerio
Represented By: Kyle G. DeValerio
Represented By: Manuel J. Dominguez
Represented By: Marc J. Greenspon
Represented By: Peter Kohn
Represented By: Matthew Ruan
Represented By: Todd A. Seaver
Represented By: Peter Bradford deLeeuw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daimler Trucks North America LLC
Represented By: Justin W. Bernick
Represented By: Meghan C. Edwards-Ford
Represented By: Benjamin F. Holt
Represented By: Richard L. Horwitz
Represented By: John Robert Robertson
Represented By: Corey W. Roush
Represented By: John Anderson Sensing
Represented By: W. Harding Drane, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel L. Goldberg
Represented By: Daniel S. Savrin
Represented By: Gregory F. Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eaton Corporation
Represented By: Erik T. Koons
Represented By: William C. Lavery
Represented By: Joseph A. Ostoyich
Represented By: Donald E. Reid
Represented By: Julie B. Rubenstein
Represented By: Andrew D. Lazerow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freightliner LLC
Represented By: Richard L. Horwitz
Represented By: W. Harding Drane, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel L. Goldberg
Represented By: Daniel S. Savrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Truck and Engine Corporation
Represented By: Kelly E. Farnan
Represented By: Leslie S. Garthwaite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenworth Truck Company
Represented By: Eric James Evain
Represented By: James D. Heisman
Represented By: Dana Kathryn Severance
Represented By: Richard R. Cook
Represented By: Carrie M. Anderson
Represented By: James C. Egan, Jr.
Represented By: Francis DiGiovanni
Represented By: M. Curt Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mack Trucks Inc.
Represented By: Daniel J. Boland
Represented By: M. Duncan Grant
Represented By: Jeremy Heep
Represented By: James Harry Stone Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navistar International Corporation
Represented By: Kelly E. Farnan
Represented By: Leslie S. Garthwaite
Represented By: Andrew Paul Bautista
Represented By: Brian Borchard
Represented By: Jennifer W. Cowen
Represented By: Daniel E. Laytin
Represented By: James H. Mutchnik
Represented By: Miriam L. Lieberman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navistar, Inc.
Represented By: Kelly E. Farnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paccar Inc.
Represented By: Eric James Evain
Represented By: James D. Heisman
Represented By: Dana Kathryn Severance
Represented By: Francis DiGiovanni
Represented By: M. Curt Lambert
Represented By: Thomas L. Boeder
Represented By: Cori G. Moore
Represented By: Catherine S. Simonsen
Represented By: Eric J. Weiss
Represented By: Meaghan Thomas-Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peterbilt Motors Company
Represented By: Eric James Evain
Represented By: James D. Heisman
Represented By: Dana Kathryn Severance
Represented By: Francis DiGiovanni
Represented By: M. Curt Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Volvo Trucks North America
Represented By: M. Duncan Grant
Represented By: James Harry Stone Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?