In Re: Heckmann Corporation Securities Litigation
Plaintiff: Mr. Matthew H. Haberkorn, Richard P. Gielata, HEK Investor Group and Ronald Sullivan
Defendant: Richard J. Heckmann, Donald G. Ezzell, James Danforth Quayle, Alfred E. Osborne, Jr., Lou Holtz, Xu Hong Bin, China Water and Drinks, Inc. and Heckmann Corporation
Case Number: 1:2010cv00378
Filed: May 6, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Referring Judge: Mary Pat Thynge
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 78
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 314 ORDER granting #311 Motion for Disbursement of Funds. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 5/13/15. (kjk)
April 24, 2015 Filing 313 AFFIDAVIT of Edward J. Sincavage, CPA re #311 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds (Net Settlement Fund) filed by Matthew H. Haberkorn, Ronald Sullivan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - H)(deLeeuw, Peter)
April 24, 2015 Filing 312 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #311 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds (Net Settlement Fund) filed by Matthew H. Haberkorn, Ronald Sullivan.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 5/11/2015. (deLeeuw, Peter)
April 24, 2015 Filing 311 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds (Net Settlement Fund) - filed by Matthew H. Haberkorn and Ronald Sullivan. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Motions referred to Mary Pat Thynge.(deLeeuw, Peter) Modified on 4/24/2015 (rpg).
April 24, 2015 CORRECTING ENTRY: docket text re #311 updated per counsel's request on 4/24/2015. (rpg)
August 27, 2014 Filing 310 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT of the following sealed documents, signed on behalf of Peter B. deLeeuw : D.I. # 158, 192 (etg, )
July 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 309 ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING RETURN OF SEALED DOCUMENTS: Pursuant to the attached STANDING ORDER dated January 8, 2013, sealed documents identified on the highlighted docket sheet will be claimed by the FILING party/attorney no later than 08/12/14. Filing attorney or their designee shall CLAIM their sealed documents by sending an E-MAIL, Subject: Return of Sealed Documents, to returnsealeddocs@ded.uscourts.gov, listing the case number and a contact's name, phone number and address. Parties not registered in CM/ECF may call our Help Desk at 302-573-6170 to claim their sealed documents. Once sealed documents are claimed, THE CLERK SHALL prepare receipts and contact filers WHEN THEIR DOCUMENTS ARE READY FOR PICK-UP at the Clerk's Office, 844 N. King Street, Intake Help Desk, Room 4209. Documents not claimed shall be unsealed and handled pursuant to the standing order. (etg) (Main Document 309 replaced on 8/6/2014) (etg, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/6/2014: #1 Highlighted Docket Sheet) (etg, ).
June 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 308 ORDER Awarding Attorneys' Fees and Expenses. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 6/26/14. (cak)
June 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 307 ORDER Approving Plan of Allocation of Net Settlement Fund. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 6/26/14. (cak)
June 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 306 FINAL JUDGMENT AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (CASE CLOSED) Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 6/26/14. (cak)
June 26, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mary Pat Thynge - Final Settlement Approval Hearing held on 6/26/2014. (Court Reporter Tanea Carroll - Hawkins Reporting) (cak)
June 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 305 ORAL ORDER The request in the letter to the Court dated 6/23/14 #304 is granted. Mr. Trippitelli is permitted to attend the Final Approval Hearing set for 6/26/14 at 9:30 AM EASTERN TIME by telephone. Ordered by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 6/23/14. (cak)
June 23, 2014 Filing 304 Letter to The Honorable Mary Pat Thynge from Susan M. Hannigan regarding a request that our co-counsel, Gerard A. Trippitelli be permitted to participate in the Final Approval Hearing telephonically. (Hannigan, Susan)
June 19, 2014 Filing 303 DECLARATION re #302 Reply Brief,, [Supplemental Declaration Of Tina Chiango Regarding (A) Mailing Of The Notice And Proof Of Claim And (B) Report On Requests For Exclusion Received] by Matthew H. Haberkorn, Ronald Sullivan. (deLeeuw, Peter)
June 19, 2014 Filing 302 REPLY BRIEF re #297 MOTION for Attorney Fees [Application For an Award Of Attorneys Fees and Litigation Expenses and Reimbursement of Costs to Lead Plaintiff], #296 MOTION for Settlement [Motion for Final Approval of Proposed Settlement and Plan of Allocation of Settlement Proceeds] [Plaintiffs Notice Of Non-Opposition To (I) Motion For Final Approval Of Class Action Settlement And Plan Of Allocation Of Settlement Proceeds And (II) Co-Lead Counsels Application For An Award Of Attorneys Fees And Litigation Expenses And Reimbursement Of Costs To Lead Plaintiff] filed by Matthew H. Haberkorn, Ronald Sullivan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(deLeeuw, Peter)
May 28, 2014 Filing 301 CONSENT to Magistrate Judge Disposition on Motion re #297 Application For an Award Of Attorneys Fees and Litigation Expenses and Reimbursement of Costs to Lead Plaintiff; and #296 Motion for Final Approval of Proposed Settlement and Plan of Allocation of Settlement Proceeds. Motions referred to Mary Pat Thynge. (ntl)
May 22, 2014 Filing 300 Joint DECLARATION re #299 Opening Brief in Support,, #298 Opening Brief in Support, #297 MOTION for Attorney Fees [Application For an Award Of Attorneys Fees and Litigation Expenses and Reimbursement of Costs to Lead Plaintiff], #296 MOTION for Settlement [Motion for Final Approval of Proposed Settlement and Plan of Allocation of Settlement Proceeds] [Joint Declaration of P. Bradford deLeeuw and Sharan Nirmul in Support of Final Approval of Settlement, Plan of Allocation and Co-Lead Counsels Application for an Award of Attorneys Fees and Litigation Expenses] by Matthew H. Haberkorn, Ronald Sullivan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(deLeeuw, Peter)
May 22, 2014 Filing 299 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #297 MOTION for Attorney Fees [Application For an Award Of Attorneys Fees and Litigation Expenses and Reimbursement of Costs to Lead Plaintiff] [Brief in Support of Co-Lead Counsels Application for an Award of Attorneys Fees and Litigation Expenses and Reimbursement of Costs to Lead Plaintiff] filed by Matthew H. Haberkorn, Ronald Sullivan.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 6/9/2014. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(deLeeuw, Peter)
May 22, 2014 Filing 298 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #296 MOTION for Settlement [Motion for Final Approval of Proposed Settlement and Plan of Allocation of Settlement Proceeds] [Plaintiffs Brief in Support of Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Plan of Allocation of Settlement Proceeds] filed by Matthew H. Haberkorn, Ronald Sullivan.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 6/9/2014. (deLeeuw, Peter)
May 22, 2014 Filing 297 MOTION for Attorney Fees [Application For an Award Of Attorneys Fees and Litigation Expenses and Reimbursement of Costs to Lead Plaintiff] - filed by Matthew H. Haberkorn, Ronald Sullivan. Motions referred to Mary Pat Thynge.(deLeeuw, Peter)
May 22, 2014 Filing 296 MOTION for Settlement [Motion for Final Approval of Proposed Settlement and Plan of Allocation of Settlement Proceeds] - filed by Matthew H. Haberkorn, Ronald Sullivan. Motions referred to Mary Pat Thynge.(deLeeuw, Peter)
May 22, 2014 Filing 295 DECLARATION re #293 SO ORDERED of Susan Walls Regarding Service of Notice to Attorneys General, Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1715 by China Water and Drinks, Inc., Donald G. Ezzell, Richard J. Heckmann, Heckmann Corporation, Lou Holtz, Alfred E. Osborne, Jr, James Danforth Quayle. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B part 1, #3 Exhibit B part 2, #4 Exhibit C)(Hannigan, Susan)
April 6, 2014 Filing 294 Official Transcript of Telephone Conference held on March 21, 2014 before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Brian P. Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/7/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014.
March 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 293 SO ORDERED re #292 Proposed Order filed by Matthew H. Haberkorn. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 3/21/14. (cak)
March 21, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mary Pat Thynge - Telephone Conference held on 3/21/2014 regarding Proposed Settlement Agreement. (Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan.) (kjk)
March 21, 2014 Filing 292 PROPOSED ORDER Approving Settlement re #286 MOTION Preliminary Approval Of Proposed Settlement [Unopposed Motion For Preliminary Approval Of Proposed Settlement] Order Preliminarily Approving Settlement by Matthew H. Haberkorn. (Monhait, Norman)
March 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 291 ORDER Setting Teleconference: A telephonic hearing has been scheduled for Friday, March 21, 2014 at 3:00 p.m. Eastern Time with Magistrate Judge Thynge to address the motion for preliminary approval of proposed settlement (DI 286). SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS. Peter Bradford deLeeuw, Esquire shall initiate the teleconference call. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 3/13/14. (cak) Modified on 3/13/2014 (cak).
March 13, 2014 CORRECTING ENTRY: The time of the telephonic hearing set for 3/21/14 with Judge Thynge is 3:00 PM, not 4:00 PM. (cak)
March 6, 2014 Filing 290 CONSENT to Magistrate Judge Disposition on Motion re #286 MOTION Preliminary Approval Of Proposed Settlement. Motion referred to Mary Pat Thynge. (ntl)
March 4, 2014 Filing 289 Letter to Chief Magistrate Judge Mary Pat Thynge from P. Bradford deLeeuw, Esq. regarding Stipulation of Settlement and Unopposed Motion For Preliminary Approval Of Proposed Settlement - re #286 MOTION Preliminary Approval Of Proposed Settlement [Unopposed Motion For Preliminary Approval Of Proposed Settlement]. (deLeeuw, Peter)
March 4, 2014 Filing 288 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #286 MOTION Preliminary Approval Of Proposed Settlement [Unopposed Motion For Preliminary Approval Of Proposed Settlement] [Plaintiffs Brief In Support Of Unopposed Motion For Preliminary Approval Of Proposed Settlement] filed by Matthew H. Haberkorn, Ronald Sullivan.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 3/21/2014. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(deLeeuw, Peter)
March 4, 2014 Filing 287 SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT [Stipulation of Settlement] by Matthew H. Haberkorn, Ronald Sullivan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A-1, #3 Exhibit A-2, #4 Exhibit A-3, #5 Exhibit B)(deLeeuw, Peter)
March 4, 2014 Filing 286 MOTION Preliminary Approval Of Proposed Settlement [Unopposed Motion For Preliminary Approval Of Proposed Settlement] - filed by Matthew H. Haberkorn, Ronald Sullivan. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order [Exhibit A - [Proposed] Order Preliminarily Approving Settlement])Motions referred to Mary Pat Thynge.(deLeeuw, Peter)
February 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 285 ORAL ORDER: Having reviewed the parties' Joint Status Report (D.I. #284 ), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following motions are DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to renew should the parties' agreement to settle this action not result in resolution of the case: D.I. #184 , D.I. #217 . ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 2/28/14. (ntl)
February 24, 2014 Filing 284 Joint STATUS REPORT by Matthew H. Haberkorn. (deLeeuw, Peter)
February 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 283 ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a joint status report shall be submitted by 2/24/14. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 2/18/14. (ntl)
January 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 282 ORDER Setting Teleconference: Peter Bradford deLeeuw, Esquire to initiate the call. A Telephone Conference is set for 1/10/2014 at 1:30 PM before Judge Mary Pat Thynge. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 1/7/14. (cak)
December 13, 2013 Filing 281 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Lead Plaintiffs Supplemental Responses And Objections To Heckmann Corporations First And Second Sets Of Interrogatories To Lead Plaintiff and Plaintiffs Supplemental Responses And Objections To Heckmann Corporations First Set Of Interrogatories To Ronald Sullivan by Matthew H. Haberkorn, Ronald Sullivan.(deLeeuw, Peter)
December 10, 2013 Filing 280 Official Transcript of Telephone Conference held on December 4, 2013 before Judge Mary Pat Thynge. Court Reporter Ellen Corbett Hannum of Veritext Reporting Services, Telephone (302) 571-0510. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/2/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/10/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/10/2014. (bpg)
December 4, 2013 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mary Pat Thynge - Telephone Conference held on 12/4/2013; The transcript shall serve as the order of the court. (Court Reporter Ellie Corbett - Veritext.) (kjk)
December 4, 2013 CORRECTING ENTRY: DI 277 Exhibit 1 replaced with correct document per request of counsel. (cak)
December 4, 2013 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER re #274 MOTION for Discovery Teleconference filed by Matthew H. Haberkorn. The transcript of the teleconference of 12/4/13 shall serve as the order of the court in this matter. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 12/4/13. (cak)
December 3, 2013 CORRECTING ENTRY: DI 280 removed from the docket since it was filed inappropriately and without permission from the Court. Therefore it will not be considered by the Court. (cak)
November 26, 2013 Filing 279 Supplemental EXHIBIT re #278 Letter to Judge Thynge by China Water and Drinks, Inc., Donald G. Ezzell, Richard J. Heckmann, Heckmann Corporation, Lou Holtz, Alfred E. Osborne, Jr, James Danforth Quayle. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-I, #2 Exhibit Exhibits J-R)(Hannigan, Susan)
November 26, 2013 Filing 278 Letter to Judge Thynge from Daniel A. Dreisbach regarding Response to Plaintiffs' Submission re: Dec. 4 Teleconference. (Hannigan, Susan)
November 25, 2013 Filing 277 Letter to Chief Magistrate Judge Mary Pat Thynge from Sharan Nirmul, Esq. and Brad deLeeuw, Esq. regarding December 4, 2013 Teleconference to Address Discovery Matters - re #273 Order Setting Teleconference,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(deLeeuw, Peter) (Attachment 1 replaced on 12/4/2013) (cak).
November 22, 2013 Filing 276 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Expert Report of David Boris; (2) Expert Report of David V. Madden; and (3) Expert Report of Alan J. Cox, Ph.D. by China Water and Drinks, Inc., Donald G. Ezzell, Richard J. Heckmann, Heckmann Corporation, Lou Holtz, Alfred E. Osborne, Jr, James Danforth Quayle.(Hannigan, Susan)
November 22, 2013 Filing 275 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Declaration Of Zachary Nye, Ph.D; Expert Report Of David A. Dodge; Report Of Richard Puntillo by Matthew H. Haberkorn.(deLeeuw, Peter)
November 22, 2013 Filing 274 MOTION for Discovery Teleconference - filed by Matthew H. Haberkorn. Motions referred to Mary Pat Thynge.(deLeeuw, Peter)
November 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 273 ORDER Setting Teleconference: Peter Bradford deLeeuw, Esquire to initiate the call. A Telephone Conference is set for 12/4/2013 at 1:30 PM EASTERN TIME before Judge Mary Pat Thynge to address a discovery issue. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 11/20/13. (cak)
November 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 272 SO ORDERED re #271 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO AMEND THE SCHEDULING ORDER. The Scheduling Order is hereby amended as follows: (1) Defendants shall respond to Plaintiffs' First Set of interrogatories and Third Set of Document Requests by no later than November 15, 2013; (2) The parties shall answer any contention interrogatories no later than December 13, 2013; (3) The parties shall answer any requests for admission no later than December 13, 2013; (4) The deadline in the Scheduling Order for the completion of expert discovery shall be extended until March 7, 2014; (5) The deadline in the Scheduling Order for the party who has the initial burden of proof on the subject matter to make the initial Federal Rule 26(a)(2) disclosure of expert testimony shall be extended until November 22, 2013. The parties shall also exchange proposed deposition dates for any experts disclosed under this paragraph on November 22, 2013; (6) The parties shall identify their rebuttal experts by no later than December 13, 2013; (7) The deadline in the Scheduling Order for rebuttal experts' reports on the same subject matter identified by another party shall be extended until January 24, 2014. The parties shall also exchange proposed deposition dates for any experts disclosed under paragraph 6 of this Order on January 24, 2014 to the extent such expert has not previously been deposed pursuant to paragraph 5 of this Order; (8) The parties shall exchange reply expert reports by no later than February 14, 2014; (9) The depositions of any experts identified pursuant to paragraph 5 of this Order shall be scheduled no earlier than December 6, 2013. If the deposition of any experts identified pursuant to paragraph 5 of this Order is sought in connection with the preparation of rebuttal reports, it shall be completed no later than January 17, 2014. The parties may elect, at their discretion, to depose any expert disclosed pursuant to paragraphs 5 and 6 of this Order after the exchange of reply expert reports, but in no event shall any expert disclosed under paragraphs 5 and 6 of this Order be deposed more than once unless otherwise ordered by the Court for good cause shown. (10) Case dispositive motions, if any, shall be filed on March 28,2014, or as otherwise permitted by the Court. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 11/7/13. (cak)
November 7, 2013 Filing 271 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME (STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO AMEND THE SCHEDULING ORDER) to - filed by Matthew H. Haberkorn. (deLeeuw, Peter)
November 7, 2013 Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Scheduling Order Amended as per DI 271. (cak)
October 20, 2013 Filing 270 Official Transcript of Telephone Conference held on September 30, 2013 before Judge Mary Pat Thynge. Court Reporter Brian P. Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/12/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/20/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/21/2014. (bpg)
October 7, 2013 Filing 269 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Requests for Admission by China Water and Drinks, Inc., Donald G. Ezzell, Richard J. Heckmann, Heckmann Corporation, Lou Holtz, Alfred E. Osborne, Jr, James Danforth Quayle.(Hannigan, Susan)
September 30, 2013 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mary Pat Thynge - Telephone Conference held on 9/30/2013; The transcript shall serve as the order of the court. (Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan.) (kjk)
September 30, 2013 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER re #265 MOTION for Teleconference to Resolve Discovery Dispute filed by Matthew H. Haberkorn. The transcript of the 9/30/13 teleconference shall serve as the order of the court in this matter. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 9/30/13. (cak)
September 26, 2013 Filing 268 Letter to Judge Thynge from Daniel A. Dreisbach regarding Parties Attending 9/30/13 Teleconference - re #265 MOTION for Hearing [Motion for Teleconference to Resolve Discovery Dispute], 264 Order, #263 Order Setting Teleconference. (Dreisbach, Daniel)
September 26, 2013 Filing 267 Letter to Judge Thynge from Daniel A. Dreisbach regarding Opposing Lead Plaintiff's Motion to Compel - re #265 MOTION for Hearing [Motion for Teleconference to Resolve Discovery Dispute], #266 Letter, #263 Order Setting Teleconference. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Dreisbach, Daniel)
September 25, 2013 Filing 266 Letter from P. Bradford deLeeuw, Esq. and Sharan Nirmul, Esq. regarding Discovery Matters - re #263 Order Setting Teleconference. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E - Proposed Order)(deLeeuw, Peter)
September 11, 2013 Filing 265 MOTION for Hearing [Motion for Teleconference to Resolve Discovery Dispute] - filed by Matthew H. Haberkorn. Motions referred to Mary Pat Thynge.(deLeeuw, Peter)
September 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 264 ORAL ORDER: The time of the teleconference with Judge Thynge set for 9/30/13 is at 9:30 a.m., not 11:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 9/11/13. (cak)
September 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 263 ORDER Setting Teleconference: Peer Bradford deLeeuw, Esquire to initiate the call. A Telephone Conference is set for 9/30/2013 at 11:00 AM before Judge Mary Pat Thynge to discuss ADR. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 9/11/13. (cak)
September 9, 2013 Filing 262 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Susan M. Hannigan regarding enclosing courtesy copies of D.I. 230 and D.I. 231. (Hannigan, Susan)
September 6, 2013 Filing 261 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (i) Response and Objections of Defendants Heckmann Corporation, Richard J. Heckmann, James Danforth Quayle, Alfred E. Osborne, Jr., Lou L. Holtz, Donald G. Ezzell, and China Water and Drinks, Inc. to Lead Plaintiff's Third Set of Requests for Production of Documents, and (ii) Objections and Responses of Defendants Heckmann Corporation, Richard J. Heckmann, James Danforth Quayle, Alfred E. Osborne, Jr., Lou L. Holtz, Donald G. Ezzell, and China Water and Drinks, Inc. to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories to Defendants by China Water and Drinks, Inc., Donald G. Ezzell, Richard J. Heckmann, Heckmann Corporation, Lou Holtz, Alfred E. Osborne, Jr, James Danforth Quayle.(Hannigan, Susan)
September 2, 2013 Filing 260 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Requests for Admission to Defendants by Matthew H. Haberkorn, Ronald Sullivan.(deLeeuw, Peter)
August 12, 2013 Filing 259 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Byron Roth on 08/26/2013 by Matthew H. Haberkorn, Ronald Sullivan.(deLeeuw, Peter)
August 6, 2013 Filing 258 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Donald G. Ezzell on August 9, 2013 by Matthew H. Haberkorn.(Nirmul, Sharan)
August 2, 2013 Filing 257 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Lead Plaintiffs Third Request for the Production of Documents and Plaintiffs First Set Of Interrogatories To Defendants by Matthew H. Haberkorn, Ronald Sullivan.(deLeeuw, Peter)
July 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 256 ORAL ORDER: The teleconference scheduled for 8/8/13 at 11:00 AM Eastern Time with Judge Thynge to address a discovery issue is cancelled. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 7/23/13. (cak)
July 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 255 ORDER Setting Teleconference: Peter Bradford deLeeuw, Esquire to initiate the call. A Telephone Conference is set for 8/8/2013 at 11:00 AM before Judge Mary Pat Thynge to discuss a discovery issue. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 7/23/13. (cak)
July 22, 2013 Filing 254 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Matthew H. Haberkorn. Amendment to #253 Notice to Take Deposition of Richard J. Heckmann on July 30, 2013 and July 31, 2013. (Nirmul, Sharan)
July 22, 2013 Filing 253 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Richard J. Heckmann on July 31, 2013 and August 1, 2013 by Matthew H. Haberkorn.(Nirmul, Sharan)
July 22, 2013 Filing 252 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Brian R. Anderson on July 25, 2013 and July 26, 2013 by Matthew H. Haberkorn.(Nirmul, Sharan)
July 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 251 SO ORDERED re #249 Stipulation and Order to Amend the Scheduling Order. Fact discovery - 9/2/13; Parties' responses to interrogatories - 12/13/13; Parties' responses to request for admissions - 12/13/13; Expert Discovery - 12/2/13; Burden of proof on subject matter - 9/30/13; Rebuttal expert discovery - 10/25/13; Case dispositive motions, if any, due 1/31/14. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 7/22/13. (cak)
July 22, 2013 Filing 250 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Susan M. Hannigan regarding enclosing courtesy copies. (Hannigan, Susan)
July 16, 2013 Filing 249 STIPULATION and [Proposed Order] to Amend the Scheduling Order re #229 Stipulation, SO ORDERED, [STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO AMEND THE SCHEDULING ORDER] by China Water and Drinks, Inc., Donald G. Ezzell, Matthew H. Haberkorn, Richard J. Heckmann, Heckmann Corporation, Lou Holtz, Alfred E. Osborne, Jr, James Danforth Quayle. (Nirmul, Sharan)
July 15, 2013 Filing 248 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Lou L. Holtz on July 22, 2013 by Matthew H. Haberkorn.(Nirmul, Sharan)
July 10, 2013 Filing 247 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Alfred E. Osborne on July 16, 2013 by Matthew H. Haberkorn.(Nirmul, Sharan)
July 8, 2013 Filing 246 RESPONSE TO OBJECTIONS by Matthew H. Haberkorn re #239 Objection to Report and Recommendations, Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Objection to Magistrate Judge Thynge's Report and Recommendation on Motion for Class Certification. (Nirmul, Sharan)
July 3, 2013 Filing 245 NOTICE to Take Deposition of James Danforth Quayle on July 10, 2013 by Matthew H. Haberkorn.(Nirmul, Sharan)
June 28, 2013 Filing 244 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Heckmann Corporation's Second Set of Interrogatories to Lead Plaintiff by China Water and Drinks, Inc., Donald G. Ezzell, Richard J. Heckmann, Heckmann Corporation, Lou Holtz, Alfred E. Osborne, Jr, James Danforth Quayle.(Hannigan, Susan)
June 25, 2013 Filing 243 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Brian J. Manske on July 18, 2013 by Matthew H. Haberkorn.(Nirmul, Sharan)
June 25, 2013 Filing 242 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Donald D. Pangburn on July 1, 2013 by Matthew H. Haberkorn.(Nirmul, Sharan)
June 24, 2013 Filing 241 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Jack Guo on June 26, 2013 by Matthew H. Haberkorn.(Nirmul, Sharan)
June 24, 2013 Filing 240 NOTICE of Deposition of Brian J. Manske by China Water and Drinks, Inc., Donald G. Ezzell, Richard J. Heckmann, Heckmann Corporation, Lou Holtz, Alfred E. Osborne, Jr, James Danforth Quayle (Hannigan, Susan)
June 20, 2013 Filing 239 OBJECTION to #236 Report and Recommendations Defendants Heckmann Corporation, Richard J. Heckmann, James Danforth Quayle, Alfred E. Osborne, Jr., Lou L. Holtz, Donald G. Ezzell, and China Water and Drinks, Inc.'s Objection to Magistrate Thynge's Report and Recommendation on Motion for Class Certification by China Water and Drinks, Inc., Donald G. Ezzell, Richard J. Heckmann, Heckmann Corporation, Lou Holtz, Alfred E. Osborne, Jr, James Danforth Quayle. (Hannigan, Susan)
June 20, 2013 Filing 238 NOTICE of Deposition of Donald D. Pangburn by China Water and Drinks, Inc., Donald G. Ezzell, Richard J. Heckmann, Heckmann Corporation, Lou Holtz, Alfred E. Osborne, Jr, James Danforth Quayle (Hannigan, Susan)
June 13, 2013 Filing 237 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Gary Levinbook on June 21, 2013 at 9:30 a.m. by audio and video by Matthew H. Haberkorn.(deLeeuw, Peter)
June 13, 2013 CORRECTING ENTRY: d.i. #237 deleted per counsel's telephone request on 6/13/2013. Counsel to re-file document. (rpg)
June 6, 2013 Filing 236 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #184 MOTION to Certify Class [Plaintiffs Motion For Class Certification And Appointment Of Class Representatives And Class Counsel] filed by Ronald Sullivan, Matthew H. Haberkorn, and #217 MOTION to Exclude Declaration of Zachary Nye, Ph.D. re #186 Declaration filed by James Danforth Quayle, China Water and Drinks, Inc., Heckmann Corporation, Lou Holtz, Richard J. Heckmann, Donald G. Ezzell, Alfred E. Osborne, Jr. Please note that when filing Objections pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b)(2), briefing consists solely of the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages) and the Response to the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages). No further briefing shall be permitted with respect to objections without leave of the Court. Objections to R&R due by 6/24/2013. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 6/6/13. (cak)
May 28, 2013 Filing 235 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Thomas R. Heckmann on 5/30/2013 by Matthew H. Haberkorn.(Nirmul, Sharan)
May 15, 2013 Filing 234 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Timothy L. Traff on May 23, 2013 by Matthew H. Haberkorn.(Nirmul, Sharan)
April 23, 2013 Filing 233 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Donald G. Ezzell, Alfred E. Osborne, Jr., James Danforth Quayle, Brian R. Anderson and Richard J. Heckmann by Matthew H. Haberkorn.(Nirmul, Sharan)
April 18, 2013 Filing 232 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoenas on Tom Heckmann and Timothy L. Traff by Matthew H. Haberkorn.(deLeeuw, Peter)
April 3, 2013 Filing 231 Letter to The Honorable Mary Pat Thynge from Sharan Nirmul and P. Bradford deLeeuw regarding Comcast Corp. v. Behrend, --- S. Ct. ----, 2013 WL 1222646 (U.S. Mar. 27, 2013) and responding to March 29, 2013 Letter from Daniel A. Dreisbach - re #230 Letter, #184 MOTION to Certify Class [Plaintiffs Motion For Class Certification And Appointment Of Class Representatives And Class Counsel]. (deLeeuw, Peter)
March 29, 2013 Filing 230 Letter to The Honorable Mary Pat Thynge from Daniel A. Dreisbach regarding Comcast Corp. v. Behrend - re #215 Answering Brief in Opposition,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Comcast Corp. v. Behrend)(Hannigan, Susan)
March 18, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #229 Stipulation and Order to Amend the Scheduling Order, filed by Heckmann Corporation, Lou Holtz, Donald G. Ezzell, Alfred E. Osborne, Jr., James Danforth Quayle, China Water and Drinks, Inc., Richard J. Heckmann, Matthew H. Haberkorn. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 3/18/13. (cak)
March 18, 2013 Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: per DI 229, the scheduling order dealines have been amended as follows: Motions to join other parties and to Amended Pleadings now due by 4/29/2013; Fact Discovery now due by 8/1/2013; Completion of Expert Discovery now 11/1/13; Initial burden of proof disclosure of expert testimony now 8/15/13; Rebuttal now 9/11/13; Case dispositives, if any, now due 12/13/13. (cak)
March 14, 2013 Filing 229 STIPULATION and [Proposed Order] to Amend the Scheduling Order re #221 Stipulation and Order, 140 Scheduling Order, [STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO AMEND THE SCHEDULING ORDER] by China Water and Drinks, Inc., Donald G. Ezzell, Matthew H. Haberkorn, Richard J. Heckmann, Heckmann Corporation, Lou Holtz, Alfred E. Osborne, Jr, James Danforth Quayle. (deLeeuw, Peter)
March 5, 2013 Filing 228 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Lou L. Holtz on April 25, 2013 by Matthew H. Haberkorn.(deLeeuw, Peter)
March 4, 2013 Filing 227 Letter to Judge Thynge from Daniel A. Dreisbach regarding Response to letter from Plaintiff's counsel dated February 28, 2013 - re #184 MOTION to Certify Class [Plaintiffs Motion For Class Certification And Appointment Of Class Representatives And Class Counsel], #226 Letter,. (Dreisbach, Daniel)
February 28, 2013 Filing 226 Letter to The Honorable Mary Pat Thynge from Sharan Nirmul and P. Bradford deLeeuw regarding Amgen Inc. v. Connecticut Retirement Plans And Trust Funds - re #184 MOTION to Certify Class [Plaintiffs Motion For Class Certification And Appointment Of Class Representatives And Class Counsel]. (Attachments: #1 Amgen Inc. v. Connecticut Retirement Plans And Trust Funds)(deLeeuw, Peter)
February 21, 2013 Filing 225 REQUEST for Oral Argument by China Water and Drinks, Inc., Donald G. Ezzell, Richard J. Heckmann, Heckmann Corporation, Lou Holtz, Alfred E. Osborne, Jr, James Danforth Quayle. (Hannigan, Susan)
February 19, 2013 Filing 224 DECLARATION re #223 Brief (Combined Answering and Reply), Declaration of Sharan Nirmul in Further Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification and Appointment of Class Representatives and Class Counsel and in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude Declaration of Zachary Nye by Matthew H. Haberkorn, Ronald Sullivan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Nirmul, Sharan)
February 19, 2013 Filing 223 BRIEF (Combined Answering and Reply) re #217 MOTION to Exclude Declaration of Zachary Nye, Ph.D. re #186 Declaration,,, , #184 MOTION to Certify Class [Plaintiffs Motion For Class Certification And Appointment Of Class Representatives And Class Counsel] filed by Matthew H. Haberkorn, Ronald Sullivan.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 3/1/2013. (Nirmul, Sharan)
February 1, 2013 Filing 222 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Alan Cox on February 12, 2013 at 9:00 a.m. by Matthew H. Haberkorn.(deLeeuw, Peter)
January 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 221 SO ORDERED: re: Stipulation and Order Regarding briefing schedule on class certification #220 . Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 1/31/2013. (cak)
January 31, 2013 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiffs omnibus reply brief due on or before 2/19/13; No additional papers shall be filed in support or opposition to the Motion for Class Certification or the Daubert Motion without leave of the Court; the deadline in the Scheduling Order to file motions and to join other parties, and to amend or supplement the pleadings, shall be extended to 3/12/13. (cak)
January 30, 2013 Filing 220 STIPULATION Regarding Briefing Schedule on Class Certification re #184 MOTION to Certify Class [Plaintiffs Motion For Class Certification And Appointment Of Class Representatives And Class Counsel], 140 Scheduling Order, [STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON CLASS CERTIFICATION] by China Water and Drinks, Inc., Donald G. Ezzell, Matthew H. Haberkorn, Richard J. Heckmann, Heckmann Corporation, Lou Holtz, Alfred E. Osborne, Jr, James Danforth Quayle. (deLeeuw, Peter)
January 18, 2013 Filing 219 DECLARATION re #217 MOTION to Exclude Declaration of Zachary Nye, Ph.D. re #186 Declaration,,, Declaration of Susan M. Hannigan in Support of Defendants' Motion to Exclude Declaration of Zachary Nye, Ph.D. by China Water and Drinks, Inc., Donald G. Ezzell, Richard J. Heckmann, Heckmann Corporation, Lou Holtz, Alfred E. Osborne, Jr, James Danforth Quayle. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Part 1, #2 Exhibit A Part 2, #3 Exhibit B Part 1, #4 Exhibit B Part 2, #5 Exhibit B Part 3)(Hannigan, Susan)
January 18, 2013 Filing 218 MEMORANDUM in Support re #217 MOTION to Exclude Declaration of Zachary Nye, Ph.D. re #186 Declaration,,, Defendants Heckmann Corporation, Richard J. Heckmann, James Danforth Quayle, Alfred E. Osborne, Jr., Lou L. Holtz, Donald G. Ezzell, and China Water and Drinks, Inc.'s Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Exclude Declaration of Zachary Nye filed by China Water and Drinks, Inc., Donald G. Ezzell, Richard J. Heckmann, Heckmann Corporation, Lou Holtz, Alfred E. Osborne, Jr, James Danforth Quayle.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 2/4/2013. (Hannigan, Susan)
January 18, 2013 Filing 217 MOTION to Exclude Declaration of Zachary Nye, Ph.D. re #186 Declaration,,, - filed by China Water and Drinks, Inc., Donald G. Ezzell, Richard J. Heckmann, Heckmann Corporation, Lou Holtz, Alfred E. Osborne, Jr, James Danforth Quayle. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 7.1.1 Statement)Motions referred to Mary Pat Thynge.(Hannigan, Susan)
January 18, 2013 Filing 216 DECLARATION re #215 Answering Brief in Opposition,, Declaration of Susan M. Hannigan in Support of Defendants' Brief in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification by China Water and Drinks, Inc., Donald G. Ezzell, Richard J. Heckmann, Heckmann Corporation, Lou Holtz, Alfred E. Osborne, Jr, James Danforth Quayle. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E, #2 Exhibit F Part 1, #3 Exhibit F Part 2, #4 Exhibit G)(Hannigan, Susan)
January 18, 2013 Filing 215 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #184 MOTION to Certify Class [Plaintiffs Motion For Class Certification And Appointment Of Class Representatives And Class Counsel] Defendants Heckmann Corporation, Richard J. Heckmann, James Danforth Quayle, Alfred E. Osborne, Jr., Lou L. Holtz, Donald G. Ezzell, and China Water and Drinks, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification filed by China Water and Drinks, Inc., Donald G. Ezzell, Richard J. Heckmann, Heckmann Corporation, Lou Holtz, Alfred E. Osborne, Jr, James Danforth Quayle.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 1/28/2013. (Hannigan, Susan)
January 18, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #214 Stipulation regarding page limits on plaintiffs' motion for class certification and appointment of class representative and class counsel. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 1/18/13. (cak)
January 17, 2013 Filing 214 STIPULATION re #184 MOTION to Certify Class [Plaintiffs Motion For Class Certification And Appointment Of Class Representatives And Class Counsel], #185 Opening Brief in Support, Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Page Limits on Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification and Appointment of Class Representative and Class Counsel by China Water and Drinks, Inc., Donald G. Ezzell, Richard J. Heckmann, Heckmann Corporation, Lou Holtz, Alfred E. Osborne, Jr, James Danforth Quayle. (Hannigan, Susan)
January 17, 2013 Filing 213 Official Transcript of Telephone Conference held on January 7, 2013 before Judge Thynge. Court Reporter Ellen Corbett Hannum of Veritext, Telephone (302) 571-0510. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/7/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/19/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/17/2013. (bpg)
January 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 212 MEMORANDUM ORDER re #181 Objections to 175 Order by Magistrate Judge Thynge are OVERRULED. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/16/13. (ntl)
January 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 211 SO ORDERED re #210 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants' Production of Privilege Log to January 31, 2013 filed by James Danforth Quayle, China Water and Drinks, Inc., Heckmann Corporation, Lou Holtz, Richard J. Heckmann, Donald G. Ezzell, Alfred E. Osborne, Jr. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 1/8/13. (cak)
January 7, 2013 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mary Pat Thynge - Telephone Conference re" status held on 1/7/2013; The transcript shall serve as the order of the court. (Court Reporter Ellie Corbett - Veritext.) (kjk)
January 7, 2013 Filing 210 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants' Production of Privilege Log to January 31, 2013 - filed by China Water and Drinks, Inc., Donald G. Ezzell, Richard J. Heckmann, Heckmann Corporation, Lou Holtz, Alfred E. Osborne, Jr, James Danforth Quayle. (Hannigan, Susan)
January 7, 2013 Opinion or Order ORDER entered #188 Telephone Conference held on 11/5/2012; The transcript shall serve as the order of the court. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 1/7/13. (cak)
January 4, 2013 Filing 209 Amended NOTICE of Taking Videotaped Deposition of Ronald Sullivan by China Water and Drinks, Inc., Donald G. Ezzell, Richard J. Heckmann, Heckmann Corporation, Lou Holtz, Alfred E. Osborne, Jr, James Danforth Quayle (Hannigan, Susan)
December 18, 2012 Filing 208 Joint STATUS REPORT by China Water and Drinks, Inc., Donald G. Ezzell, Richard J. Heckmann, Heckmann Corporation, Lou Holtz, Alfred E. Osborne, Jr, James Danforth Quayle. (Hannigan, Susan)
December 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORAL ORDER: At the request of counsel, the discovery dispute teleconference scheduled for 12/11/12 at 11:00 AM with Judge Thynge is cancelled. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 12/6/2012. (cak)
December 6, 2012 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #206 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Briefing on Class Certification to January 18, 2013 filed by Matthew H. Haberkorn. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 12/6/2012. (cak)
December 5, 2012 Filing 206 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Briefing on Class Certification to January 18, 2013 - filed by Matthew H. Haberkorn. (deLeeuw, Peter)
December 3, 2012 Filing 205 MOTION for Hearing (Teleconference) to Resolve Discovery Dispute - filed by China Water and Drinks, Inc., Donald G. Ezzell, Richard J. Heckmann, Heckmann Corporation, Lou Holtz, Alfred E. Osborne, Jr, James Danforth Quayle. Motions referred to Mary Pat Thynge.(Hannigan, Susan)
December 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER Setting Teleconference: Peter Bradford deLeeuw, Esquire to initiate the call. A Telephone Conference is set for 12/11/2012 at 11:00 AM before Judge Mary Pat Thynge to address a discovery issue. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 12/3/2012. (cak)
November 29, 2012 Filing 203 [SEALED] Transcript of Telephone Conference held on November 5, 2012 before Judge Mary Pat Thynge. Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan. (bpg)
November 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER granting #201 Motion to Seal transcript of 11/5/2012 teleconference. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 11/28/2012. (cak)
November 27, 2012 Filing 201 MOTION to Seal [Lead Plaintiffs Uncontested Motion To Seal Hearing Transcript] - filed by Matthew H. Haberkorn. Motions referred to Mary Pat Thynge.(deLeeuw, Peter)
November 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER vacating #198 Joint MOTION for Hearing (Teleconference To Resolve Discovery Dispute). Counsel resolved dispute, teleconference cancelled. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 11/20/2012. (cak)
November 20, 2012 Filing 199 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Extending Defendants' Substantial Completion Date for Document Production by China Water and Drinks, Inc., Donald G. Ezzell, Richard J. Heckmann, Heckmann Corporation, Lou Holtz, Alfred E. Osborne, Jr, James Danforth Quayle. (Hannigan, Susan)
November 20, 2012 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #199 Stipulation filed by James Danforth Quayle, China Water and Drinks, Inc., Heckmann Corporation, Lou Holtz, Richard J. Heckmann, Donald G. Ezzell, Alfred E. Osborne, Jr. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 11/20/2012. (cak)
November 16, 2012 Filing 198 Joint MOTION for Hearing (Teleconference To Resolve Discovery Dispute) - filed by China Water and Drinks, Inc., Donald G. Ezzell, Matthew H. Haberkorn, Richard J. Heckmann, Heckmann Corporation, Lou Holtz, Alfred E. Osborne, Jr, James Danforth Quayle. Motions referred to Mary Pat Thynge.(deLeeuw, Peter)
November 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER Setting Teleconference: Peter Bradford deLeeuw, Esquire to initiate the call. A Telephone Conference is set for 11/26/2012 at 12:00 NOON Eastern Time before Judge Mary Pat Thynge to address discovery issues. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 11/16/2012. (cak) Modified on 11/16/2012 (cak).
November 16, 2012 CORRECTING ENTRY: DI 197 description corrected to show the teleconference with Judge Thynge is scheduled for 12:00 NOON, not 12:00 a.m. (cak)
November 6, 2012 Filing 196 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Zachary Nye, Ph.D. on November 9, 2012 by China Water and Drinks, Inc., Donald G. Ezzell, Richard J. Heckmann, Heckmann Corporation, Lou Holtz, Alfred E. Osborne, Jr, James Danforth Quayle.(Hannigan, Susan)
November 5, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mary Pat Thynge - Telephone Conference held on 11/5/2012; The transcript shall serve as the order of the court. (Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan.) (kjk)
November 2, 2012 Filing 195 [SEALED] NOTICE of Withdrawal of Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information, or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action by China Water and Drinks, Inc., Donald G. Ezzell, Richard J. Heckmann, Heckmann Corporation, Lou Holtz, Alfred E. Osborne, Jr, James Danforth Quayle re #187 Notice of Service (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Hannigan, Susan)
November 1, 2012 Filing 194 RESPONSE TO OBJECTIONS by Matthew H. Haberkorn re #177 Transcript,, #165 Notice (Other), #181 Objections, [Lead Plaintiffs Response To Defendants Objections To Magistrate Judge Thynges Order On Defendants Motion To Enter Briefing Schedule]. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(deLeeuw, Peter)
November 1, 2012 Filing 193 [SEALED] Letter to Judge Thynge from Daniel A. Dreisbach regarding Response to Plaintiff's October 31, 2012 letter re: discovery disputes - re #192 Letter,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Hannigan, Susan)
November 1, 2012 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #191 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Briefing on Class Certification to December 21, 2012 filed by James Danforth Quayle, China Water and Drinks, Inc., Heckmann Corporation, Lou Holtz, Richard J. Heckmann, Donald G. Ezzell, Alfred E. Osborne, Jr. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 11/1/2012. (cak)
November 1, 2012 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Answering Brief on Class Certification now due 12/21/2012 per DI 191 (cak)
October 31, 2012 Filing 192 SEALED Letter to The Honorable Mary Pat Thnyge from Sharan Nirmul, Esq. and P. Bradford deLeeuw, Esq. regarding Lead Plaintiff's Motion to Compel - re #62 Order, #188 Joint MOTION for Hearing (Teleconference To Resolve Discovery Dispute). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(deLeeuw, Peter)
October 31, 2012 Filing 191 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Briefing on Class Certification to December 21, 2012 - filed by China Water and Drinks, Inc., Donald G. Ezzell, Richard J. Heckmann, Heckmann Corporation, Lou Holtz, Alfred E. Osborne, Jr, James Danforth Quayle. (Dreisbach, Daniel)
October 25, 2012 Filing 190 NOTICE of Taking Videotaped Deposition of Ronald Sullivan and Requests for Production of Documents by China Water and Drinks, Inc., Donald G. Ezzell, Richard J. Heckmann, Heckmann Corporation, Lou Holtz, Alfred E. Osborne, Jr, James Danforth Quayle (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hannigan, Susan)
October 25, 2012 Filing 189 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Heckmann Corporation's First Set of Requests for Admission to Ronald Sullivan; (2) Heckmann Corporation's First Set of Interrogatories to Ronald Sullivan; and (3) Heckmann Corporation's First Request for Production of Documents to Ronald Sullivan by China Water and Drinks, Inc., Donald G. Ezzell, Richard J. Heckmann, Heckmann Corporation, Lou Holtz, Alfred E. Osborne, Jr, James Danforth Quayle.(Hannigan, Susan)
October 25, 2012 Filing 188 Joint MOTION for Hearing (Teleconference To Resolve Discovery Dispute) - filed by China Water and Drinks, Inc., Donald G. Ezzell, Matthew H. Haberkorn, Richard J. Heckmann, Heckmann Corporation, Lou Holtz, Alfred E. Osborne, Jr, James Danforth Quayle. Motions referred to Mary Pat Thynge.(deLeeuw, Peter)
October 25, 2012 CORRECTING ENTRY: d.i. #187 placed under seal per counsel's telephone request on 10/25/2012. (rpg)
October 24, 2012 Filing 187 SEALED DOCUMENT by China Water and Drinks, Inc., Donald G. Ezzell, Richard J. Heckmann, Heckmann Corporation, Lou Holtz, Alfred E. Osborne, Jr, James Danforth Quayle.(Hannigan, Susan) (rpg). Modified on 10/25/2012 (rpg).
October 19, 2012 Filing 186 DECLARATION re #184 MOTION to Certify Class [Plaintiffs Motion For Class Certification And Appointment Of Class Representatives And Class Counsel] [Declaration Of Sharan Nirmul In Further Support Of Plaintiffs' Motion For Class Certification And Appointment Of Class Representatives And Class Counsel] by Matthew H. Haberkorn, Ronald Sullivan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certification of Ronald Sullivan, #2 Exhibit 2 - Excerpts from Heckmann Corp. Form 10-Q dated November 9, 2011, #3 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Zachary Nye, Ph.D., #4 Exhibit 4- Firm Resume of Kessler Topaz Meltzer & Check, LLP, #5 Exhibit 5 - Firm Resume of Rosenthal, Monhait & Goddess, P.A., #6 Exhibit 6 - Excerpt from Heckmann Corp. March 16, 2009 Form 10-K, #7 Exhibit 7 - Heckmann Corp. March 14, 2011 Form 8-K)(deLeeuw, Peter)
October 19, 2012 Filing 185 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #184 MOTION to Certify Class [Plaintiffs Motion For Class Certification And Appointment Of Class Representatives And Class Counsel] filed by Matthew H. Haberkorn, Ronald Sullivan.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 11/5/2012. (deLeeuw, Peter)
October 19, 2012 Filing 184 MOTION to Certify Class [Plaintiffs Motion For Class Certification And Appointment Of Class Representatives And Class Counsel] - filed by Matthew H. Haberkorn, Ronald Sullivan. Motions referred to Mary Pat Thynge.(deLeeuw, Peter)
October 19, 2012 Filing 183 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Susan M. Hannigan regarding enclosing courtesy copies of objections filed by defendants on October 18, 2012 - re #181 Objections,. (Hannigan, Susan)
October 18, 2012 Filing 182 DECLARATION re #181 Objections, of Gerard A. Trippitelli in Support of Defendants' Objections to Magistrate Judge Thynge's Order on Defendants' Motion for a Briefing Schedule by China Water and Drinks, Inc., Donald G. Ezzell, Richard J. Heckmann, Heckmann Corporation, Lou Holtz, Alfred E. Osborne, Jr, James Danforth Quayle. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Hannigan, Susan)
October 18, 2012 Filing 181 OBJECTIONS by China Water and Drinks, Inc., Donald G. Ezzell, Richard J. Heckmann, Heckmann Corporation, Lou Holtz, Alfred E. Osborne, Jr, James Danforth Quayle to #177 Transcript,, 175 Order, Defendants' Objections to Magistrate Judge Thynge's Order on Defendants' Motion to Enter Briefing Schedule.. (Attachments: #1 Certification)(Hannigan, Susan)
October 18, 2012 Filing 180 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoenas directed to Timothly L. Traff and Tom Heckmann by Matthew H. Haberkorn.(deLeeuw, Peter)
October 17, 2012 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #179 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Gerard A. Trippitelli, DLA Piper to represent Defendants, Heckmann Corporation, Richard J. Heckmann, James Danforth Quayle, Alfred E. Osborne, Jr., Lou L. Holtz, Donald G. Ezzell, and China Water and Drinks, Inc. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 10/17/2012. (cak)
October 15, 2012 Filing 179 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Gerald A. Trippitelli, DLA Piper LLP - filed by China Water and Drinks, Inc., Donald G. Ezzell, Richard J. Heckmann, Heckmann Corporation, Lou Holtz, Alfred E. Osborne, Jr, James Danforth Quayle. Motions referred to Mary Pat Thynge.(Hannigan, Susan)
October 15, 2012 Filing 178 Amended NOTICE of Deposition to Lead Plaintiff Matthew Haberkorn by Heckmann Corporation (Hannigan, Susan)
October 10, 2012 Filing 177 Official Transcript of Telephone Conference held on October 4, 2012 before Judge Mary Pat Thynge. Court Reporter Heather Triozzi of Hawkins Reporting Service, Telephone (302) 658-9971. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/31/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/13/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/8/2013. (bpg)
October 5, 2012 Filing 176 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoena directed to Glass, Lewis & Co., LLC by Matthew H. Haberkorn.(deLeeuw, Peter)
October 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORAL ORDER re #168 Joint MOTION for Hearing (Teleconference to Resolve Discovery Dispute). Transcript of 10/4/2012 teleconference shall serve as the Order of the Court in this matter. Motion to Enter Proposed Briefing Schedule #165 is DENIED. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 10/4/2012. (cak)
October 4, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mary Pat Thynge - Telephone Conference held on 10/4/2012; The transcript shall serve as the order of the court. (Court Reporter Heather Triozzi - ( Hawkins Reporting ).) (kjk)
October 3, 2012 Filing 174 Letter to The Honorable Mary Pat Thynge from Sharan Nirmul, Esq. and P. Bradford deLeeuw, Esq. regarding Discovery Issues and Motion to Compel - re #167 Order Setting Teleconference. (deLeeuw, Peter)
October 2, 2012 Filing 173 Letter to The Honorable Mary Pat Thynge from P. Bradford deLeeuw, Esq. regarding The Discovery Teleconference Scheduled for October 4, 2012 - re #167 Order Setting Teleconference. (deLeeuw, Peter)
October 2, 2012 Filing 172 DECLARATION re #171 Letter, of Gerald A. Triippitelli by China Water and Drinks, Inc., Donald G. Ezzell, Richard J. Heckmann, Heckmann Corporation, Lou Holtz, Alfred E. Osborne, Jr, James Danforth Quayle. (Dreisbach, Daniel)
October 2, 2012 Filing 171 Letter to Magistrate Judge Thynge from Daniel A. Dreisbach regarding Discovery issues and motion to compel - re #167 Order Setting Teleconference, #168 Joint MOTION for Hearing (Teleconference to Resolve Discovery Dispute). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Letter)(Dreisbach, Daniel)
September 28, 2012 Filing 170 RESPONSE to Motion re #162 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Counts I-III and that Plaintiff Cannot Recover as Damages the Funds Put Into Escrow Following the Company's IPO [LEAD PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO ENTER PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE (D.I. 165)] filed by Matthew H. Haberkorn. (deLeeuw, Peter)
September 27, 2012 Filing 169 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoenas by Richard P. Gielata, HEK Investor Group, Matthew H. Haberkorn.(deLeeuw, Peter)
September 26, 2012 Filing 168 Joint MOTION for Hearing (Teleconference to Resolve Discovery Dispute) - filed by China Water and Drinks, Inc., Donald G. Ezzell, Richard J. Heckmann, Heckmann Corporation, Lou Holtz, Alfred E. Osborne, Jr, James Danforth Quayle. Motions referred to Mary Pat Thynge.(Hannigan, Susan)
September 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER Setting Teleconference: Defense counsel to initiate the call. A Telephone Conference is set for 10/4/2012 at 10:00 AM before Judge Mary Pat Thynge to address discovery issues. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 9/26/2012. (cak)
September 24, 2012 Filing 166 Official Transcript of Telephone Conference. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter, Deanna Warner of Hawkins Reporting Service. Telephone: (302) 658-6697 before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/15/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/25/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/26/2012. (bpg)
September 19, 2012 Filing 165 NOTICE of -- Motion to Enter Proposed Briefing Schedule by China Water and Drinks, Inc., Donald G. Ezzell, Richard J. Heckmann, Heckmann Corporation, Lou Holtz, Alfred E. Osborne, Jr, James Danforth Quayle re 140 Scheduling Order, (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dreisbach, Daniel)
September 19, 2012 Filing 164 DECLARATION re #162 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Counts I-III and that Plaintiff Cannot Recover as Damages the Funds Put Into Escrow Following the Company's IPO, #163 Opening Brief in Support, (Decl. of Susan M. Hannigan) by China Water and Drinks, Inc., Donald G. Ezzell, Richard J. Heckmann, Heckmann Corporation, Lou Holtz, Alfred E. Osborne, Jr, James Danforth Quayle. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Hannigan, Susan)
September 19, 2012 Filing 163 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #162 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Counts I-III and that Plaintiff Cannot Recover as Damages the Funds Put Into Escrow Following the Company's IPO filed by China Water and Drinks, Inc., Donald G. Ezzell, Richard J. Heckmann, Heckmann Corporation, Lou Holtz, Alfred E. Osborne, Jr, James Danforth Quayle.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 10/9/2012. (Hannigan, Susan)
September 19, 2012 Filing 162 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Counts I-III and that Plaintiff Cannot Recover as Damages the Funds Put Into Escrow Following the Company's IPO - filed by China Water and Drinks, Inc., Donald G. Ezzell, Richard J. Heckmann, Heckmann Corporation, Lou Holtz, Alfred E. Osborne, Jr, James Danforth Quayle. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Motions referred to Mary Pat Thynge.(Hannigan, Susan)
September 13, 2012 Filing 161 NOTICE OF SERVICE of of Defendants Heckmann Corporation, Richard J. Heckmann, James Danforth Quayle, Alfred E. Osborne, Jr., Lou L. Holtz, Donald G. Ezzell, and China Water and Drinks, Inc.'s Disclosures Pursuant to Section 3 of the Delaware Default Standard for Discovery and Certificate of Service by China Water and Drinks, Inc., Donald G. Ezzell, Richard J. Heckmann, Heckmann Corporation, Lou Holtz, Alfred E. Osborne, Jr, James Danforth Quayle.(Hannigan, Susan)
August 28, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mary Pat Thynge - Telephone Conference held on 8/28/2012; The transcript shall serve as the order of the court. (kjk)
August 27, 2012 Filing 160 NOTICE OF SERVICE of of Subpoenas Directed to Pinnacle Advisors, L.P., Joseph Tiano, Jr. and Jack Guo by Matthew H. Haberkorn.(deLeeuw, Peter)
August 24, 2012 Filing 159 SEALED Letter to Magistrate Judge Thynge from Daniel A. Dreisbach regarding Response to Plaintiff's August 23, 2012 Letter Brief - re #158 Letter, #157 Order Setting Teleconference. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Dreisbach, Daniel)
August 24, 2012 CORRECTING ENTRY: DI 159 was removed and will be refiled as a Sealed Letter, not a Sealed Brief. (cak)
August 23, 2012 Filing 158 SEALED Letter to The Honorable Mary Pat Thynge from P. Bradford deLeeuw regarding Lead Plaintiff's August 23, 2012 Letter To The Honorable Mary Pat Thynge. (deLeeuw, Peter)
August 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER Setting Teleconference: Jesica Zeldin, Esquire to initiate the call. A Telephone Conference is set for 8/28/2012 at 01:30 PM before Judge Mary Pat Thynge to address a discovery issue. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 8/17/2012. (cak)
August 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 156 SO ORDERED re #152 Stipulation and Proposed Order filed by James Danforth Quayle, China Water and Drinks, Inc., Heckmann Corporation, Lou Holtz, Richard J. Heckmann, Donald G. Ezzell, Alfred E. Osborne, Jr. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 8/6/2012. (cak)
August 1, 2012 Filing 155 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Responses to Lead Plaintiff's Second Set of Requests for the Production of Documents by China Water and Drinks, Inc., Donald G. Ezzell, Richard J. Heckmann, Heckmann Corporation, Lou Holtz, Alfred E. Osborne, Jr, James Danforth Quayle.(Hannigan, Susan)
July 30, 2012 Filing 154 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Richard J. Heckmann, James Danforth Quayle, Alfred E. Osborne, Jr., Lou J. Holtz, Donald G. Ezzell, Heckmann Corporation and China Water and Drinks, Inc.'s Responses to Lead Plaintiff's Corrected First Set of Requests for the Production of Documents by China Water and Drinks, Inc., Donald G. Ezzell, Richard J. Heckmann, Heckmann Corporation, Lou Holtz, Alfred E. Osborne, Jr, James Danforth Quayle.(Hannigan, Susan)
July 30, 2012 Filing 153 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Lead Plaintiffs Responses and Objections to Heckmann Corporations First Set of Requests for the Production of Documents; (2) Lead Plaintiffs Responses and Objections to Heckmann Corporations First Set of Requests for Admission; (3) Lead Plaintiffs Responses and Objections to Heckmann Corporations First Set of Interrogatories; and (4) Lead Plaintiffs Responses and Objections to Defendant Heckmann Corporations Notice of Deposition to Lead Plaintiff Matthew Haberkorn by Matthew H. Haberkorn.(deLeeuw, Peter)
July 30, 2012 Filing 152 STIPULATION Stipulation and [Proposed] Order by China Water and Drinks, Inc., Donald G. Ezzell, Richard J. Heckmann, Heckmann Corporation, Lou Holtz, Alfred E. Osborne, Jr, James Danforth Quayle. (Hannigan, Susan)
July 23, 2012 Filing 151 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoena directed to DLA Piper LLP (US) by Matthew H. Haberkorn.(deLeeuw, Peter)
July 20, 2012 Filing 150 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoenas Directed to Ernst & Young LLP, Madsen & Associates CPAs, Inc., Credit Suisse (USA) LLC, GHP Horwath, P.C., Roth Capital Partners, LLC and The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc. by Matthew H. Haberkorn.(deLeeuw, Peter)
July 9, 2012 Filing 149 ANSWER to Amended Complaint ANSWER to #52 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by China Water and Drinks, Inc., Donald G. Ezzell, Richard J. Heckmann, Heckmann Corporation, Lou Holtz, Alfred E. Osborne, Jr, James Danforth Quayle.(Dreisbach, Daniel)
July 6, 2012 Filing 148 Official Transcript of Telephone Conference held on June 14, 2012 before Judge Mary Pat Thynge. Court Reporter Brian P. Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/27/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/6/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/4/2012. (bpg)
July 3, 2012 Filing 147 NOTICE of Service and Certificate of Service of Defendants Heckmann Corporation, Richard J. Heckmann, James Danforth Quayle, Alfred E. Osborne, Jr., Lou J. Holtz, Donald G. Ezzell and China Water and Drinks, Inc.'s Initial Disclosures by China Water and Drinks, Inc., Donald G. Ezzell, Richard J. Heckmann, Heckmann Corporation, Lou Holtz, Alfred E. Osborne, Jr, James Danforth Quayle (Hannigan, Susan)
July 3, 2012 Filing 146 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Lead Plaintiffs Initial Disclosures Pursuant To Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) by Matthew H. Haberkorn.(deLeeuw, Peter)
June 29, 2012 Filing 145 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Lead Plaintiffs Second Set Of Requests For The Production Of Documents by Matthew H. Haberkorn.(deLeeuw, Peter)
June 27, 2012 Filing 144 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (i) Heckmann Corporation's First Request for Production of Documents to Lead Plaintiff; (ii) Heckmann Corporation's First Set of Interrogatories to Lead Plaintiff; and (iii) Heckmann Corporation's First Set of Requests for Admission to Lead Plaintiff by China Water and Drinks, Inc., Donald G. Ezzell, Richard J. Heckmann, Heckmann Corporation, Lou Holtz, Alfred E. Osborne, Jr, James Danforth Quayle.(Hannigan, Susan)
June 27, 2012 Filing 143 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Matthew Haberkorn on September 26, 2012 at 9:30 a.m. by China Water and Drinks, Inc., Donald G. Ezzell, Richard J. Heckmann, Heckmann Corporation, Lou Holtz, Alfred E. Osborne, Jr, James Danforth Quayle.(Dreisbach, Daniel)
June 26, 2012 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #141 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Answer Amended Class Action Complaint to July 9, 2012 filed by James Danforth Quayle, China Water and Drinks, Inc., Heckmann Corporation, Lou Holtz, Richard J. Heckmann, Donald G. Ezzell, Alfred E. Osborne, Jr. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 6/26/2012. (cak)
June 25, 2012 Filing 142 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Lead Plaintiffs Corrected First Set Of Requests For The Production Of Documents by Matthew H. Haberkorn.(deLeeuw, Peter)
June 25, 2012 Filing 141 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Answer Amended Class Action Complaint to July 9, 2012 - filed by China Water and Drinks, Inc., Donald G. Ezzell, Richard J. Heckmann, Heckmann Corporation, Lou Holtz, Alfred E. Osborne, Jr, James Danforth Quayle. (Hannigan, Susan)
June 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 140 SCHEDULING ORDER: #138 Joinder of Parties due by 1/29/2013. Amended Pleadings due by 1/29/2013. Fact Discovery Cut-Off by 5/3/2013. Expert Discovery Cut-Off by 8/2/2013. Status Report due by 12/18/2012. A Status Conference is set for 1/7/2013 at 01:00 PM before Judge Mary Pat Thynge Dispositive Motions due by 9/13/2013. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 6/25/2012. (cak) Modified on 6/25/2012 (cak).
June 25, 2012 Filing 139 Letter to The Honorable Mary Pat Thynge from P. Bradford deLeeuw regarding Proposed Scheduling Order - re #138 Proposed Order. (deLeeuw, Peter)
June 25, 2012 Filing 138 PROPOSED ORDER (Scheduling Order) by Matthew H. Haberkorn. (deLeeuw, Peter)
June 25, 2012 CORRECTING ENTRY: Added reference to DI 138 (Scheduling Order). (cak)
June 22, 2012 Filing 137 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Lead Plaintiffs First Set Of Requests For The Production Of Documents by Matthew H. Haberkorn.(deLeeuw, Peter)
June 19, 2012 Filing 136 Letter to The Honorable Mary Pat Thynge from P. Bradford deLeeuw regarding [JOINT LETTER RE CONSENT OR NON-CONSENT TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE ACTING AS MEDIATOR]. (deLeeuw, Peter)
June 14, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mary Pat Thynge - Telephone Conference held on 6/14/2012; Counsel will file a Revised Propsed Scheduling Order; The transcript shall serve as the order of the court. (Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan.) (kjk)
June 11, 2012 Filing 135 Letter to The Hon. Mary Pat Thynge from P. Bradford deLeeuw regarding the (Proposed) Scheduling Order - re #134 Response to Order. (deLeeuw, Peter)
June 11, 2012 Filing 134 RESPONSE to Order re #130 Order Setting Teleconference,, (Proposed) Scheduling Order to be filed by June 11, 2012 filed by Matthew H. Haberkorn. (deLeeuw, Peter)
June 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 133 SO ORDERED re #132 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer the Complaint to June 29, 2012 filed by James Danforth Quayle, China Water and Drinks, Inc., Heckmann Corporation, Lou Holtz, Richard J. Heckmann, Donald G. Ezzell, Alfred E. Osborne, Jr. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 6/8/2012. (cak)
June 8, 2012 Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: All Defendants answer now due 6/29/2012. (cak)
June 7, 2012 Filing 132 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer the Complaint to June 29, 2012 - filed by China Water and Drinks, Inc., Donald G. Ezzell, Richard J. Heckmann, Heckmann Corporation, Lou Holtz, Alfred E. Osborne, Jr, James Danforth Quayle. (Dreisbach, Daniel)
June 7, 2012 Filing 131 Official Transcript of Telephone Conference held on May 17, 2012 before Judge Mary Pat Thynge. Court Reporter Sandra J. Worrell of Veritext Reporting, Telephone (302) 571-0510. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/28/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/9/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/5/2012. (bpg)
May 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER Setting Teleconference: a scheduling teleconference has been scheduled for Thursday, June 14, 2012 at 9:30 a.m. Eastern Time with Magistrate Judge Thynge. A copy of Judge Thynges Rule 16 Scheduling Order is attached. Counsel shall confer prior to the scheduled teleconference and efile a proposed scheduling order on or before Monday, June 11, 2012. P. Bradford deLeeuw, Esquire shall initiate the teleconference call. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 5/31/2012. (Attachments: #1 Form of Scheduling Order)(cak)
May 31, 2012 Filing 129 Letter to The Honorable Mary Pat Thynge from P. Bradford deLeeuw regarding Judge Stark's May 25, 2012 Memorandum Order and request for scheduling conference - re #126 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations, Order on Report and Recommendations. (deLeeuw, Peter)
May 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 128 SO ORDERED re #127 Stipulated Confidentiality Order. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 5/29/2012. (cak)
May 25, 2012 Filing 127 PROPOSED ORDER Confidentiality Order [STIPULATED [PROPOSED] CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER] by Matthew H. Haberkorn. (deLeeuw, Peter)
May 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 126 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Objections are OVERRULED and Report and Recommendation (D.I. #84 , #105 ) is ADOPTED; the motions to dismiss (D.I. #63 , #69 ) are DENIED. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/25/12. (ntl)
May 17, 2012 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER A teleconference has been scheduled for 8/28/2012 at 1:30 PM Eastern Time. Plaintiff's counsel shall initiate the teleconference call. The purpose of the teleconference is to discuss the issues outlined by the court during the 5/17/2012 teleconference. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 5/17/2012. (cak)
May 17, 2012 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER The Court having held a teleconference with counsel to address the discovery issues contained in the parties motion #122 and submissions #124 and #125 , IT IS ORDERED that the transcript of the discussions and rulings during the teleconference of 5/17/2012, shall serve as the Order of the Court in this matter. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 5/17/2012. (cak)
May 17, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mary Pat Thynge - Telephone Conference held on 5/17/2012; The transcript shall serve as the order of the court. (Court Reporter Sandy Worrell - Veritex.) (kjk)
May 16, 2012 Filing 125 Letter to Magistrate Judge Thynge from Daniel A. Dreisbach regarding Response to Plaintiff's May 15, 2012 letter re: further limited relief from the PSLRA discovery stay - re #123 Order Setting Teleconference, #120 Order, #124 Letter. (Dreisbach, Daniel)
May 15, 2012 Filing 124 Letter to The Honorable Mary Pat Thynge from Sharan Nirmul, Esq. and P. Bradford deLeeuw, Esq. regarding further limited relief from the PSLRA discovery stay - re #120 Order,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(deLeeuw, Peter)
May 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER Setting Teleconference (Peter Bradford deLeeuw, Esquire to initiate the call): The teleconference scheduled for 5/17/2012 with Judge Thynge to address a discovery matter will now take place at 1:30 p.m. Eastern Time. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 5/8/2012. (cak)
April 20, 2012 Filing 122 MOTION for Hearing [MOTION FOR TELECONFERENCE TO RESOLVE DISCOVERY DISPUTE] - filed by Matthew H. Haberkorn. Motions referred to Mary Pat Thynge.(deLeeuw, Peter)
April 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER Setting Teleconference (Peter Bradford deLeeuw, Esquire to initiate the call): A Telephone Conference is set for 5/17/2012 at 03:00 PM before Judge Mary Pat Thynge to address a discovery issue. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 4/20/2012. (cak)
February 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER The Court having held a teleconference with counsel to address the discovery issues contained in the motion for teleconference for discovery dispute #118 and the parties submissions #115 and #119 , IT IS ORDERED that the transcript of the discussions and rulings during the teleconference of February 15, 2012, shall serve as the Order of the Court in this matter. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 2/15/2012. (cak)
February 15, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mary Pat Thynge - Telephone Conference held on 2/15/2012; The transcript shall serve as the order of the court. (Court Reporter Val Gunning.) (kjk)
February 13, 2012 Filing 119 Letter to Magistrate Judge Thynge from Daniel A. Dreisbach regarding Response to Plaintiff's February 1, 2012 letter renewing modification of the PSLRA discovery stay - re #117 Order Setting Teleconference, #116 Order,, Telephone Conference, Oral Argument, #118 MOTION [Discovery Matters - Motion to Resolve Discovery Dispute], #115 Letter,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A and B to Letter to Magistrate Judge Thynge)(Dreisbach, Daniel)
February 6, 2012 Filing 118 MOTION [Discovery Matters - Motion to Resolve Discovery Dispute] - filed by Matthew H. Haberkorn. Motions referred to Mary Pat Thynge.(deLeeuw, Peter)
February 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER Setting Teleconference (Peter Bradford deLeeuw, Esquire to initiate the call): A Telephone Conference is set for 2/15/2012 at 02:00 PM before Judge Mary Pat Thynge to address a discovery issue. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 2/6/2012. (cak)
February 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER The Court is in receipt of plaintiffs letter request renewing their motion for a partial modification of the PSLRA discovery stay (D.I. 15). Counsel are reminded to follow the procedures set out in Judge Thynges order regarding discovery disputes (D.I. 62). Therefore, IT IS ORDERED that counsel for plaintiff shall contact defense counsel and together contact Chambers to get a time and date for a teleconference to address the issues contained in the letter request. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 2/2/2012. (cak)
February 1, 2012 Filing 115 Letter to The Hon. Mary P. Thynge from P. Bradford deLeeuw and Sharan Nirmul regarding renewing motion for a partial modification of the PSLRA discovery stay to permit plaintiff to obtain the documents sought in the PLSRA motion - re #98 Letter,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(deLeeuw, Peter)
December 2, 2011 Filing 114 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Matthew H. Haberkorn. Xu Hong Bin served on 11/30/2011, answer due 12/21/2011. (deLeeuw, Peter)
November 22, 2011 Filing 113 MEMORANDUM OPINION Haberkorn's motion for leave to serve process by alternative means #89 under Fed.R.Civ.P. 4(f)(3) is granted in part and denied in part. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 11/22/2011. (cak)
November 18, 2011 Filing 112 Letter to Magistrate Judge Thynge from Daniel A. Dreisbach regarding Enclosing 10/25/11 Oral Argument Transcript - re Oral Argument, #111 Transcript,,. (Dreisbach, Daniel)
November 14, 2011 Filing 111 OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Oral Argument Hearing held on October 25, 2011 before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter: Brian Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/5/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/15/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/13/2012. (bpg)
October 25, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark - Oral Argument held on 10/25/2011. (Court Reporter B. Gaffigan.) (ntl)
October 4, 2011 Filing 110 Letter to The Honorable Mary Pat Thynge from Sharan Nirmul and P. Bradford deLeeuw regarding recent events relevant to request to modify PSLRA discovery stay and motion to serve process upon defendant Xu Hong Bin by alternative means - re #96 Letter, Telephone Conference, #89 MOTION Leave to Serve Process by Alternative Means LEAD PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE PROCESS BY ALTERNATIVE MEANS. (deLeeuw, Peter)
October 3, 2011 Filing 109 Letter to Peter Bradford deLeeuw from Kenneth J. Nachbar regarding confirming recent conversation that Brian Capitummino, Israel Dahan and Kenenth Nachbar will be notified if oral argument is scheduled on Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Serve Process by Alternative Means, or if there are other developments concerning the Motion - re #89 MOTION Leave to Serve Process by Alternative Means LEAD PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE PROCESS BY ALTERNATIVE MEANS. (Nachbar, Kenneth)
September 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Oral Argument scheduled for 10/5/11 at 9:30 AM is CANCELLED; the Oral Argument is hereby rescheduled for 10/25/11 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6B. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/30/11. (ntl)
September 30, 2011 Filing 107 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from P. Bradford deLeeuw, Esq. regarding copies of pleadings requested by Chambers. (deLeeuw, Peter)
September 29, 2011 Filing 106 Letter to Judge Stark from Daniel A. Dreisbach regarding Submissions for Motions to Dismiss. (Dreisbach, Daniel)
September 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER: The Order and Recommended Disposition contained in the Report and Recommendations dated June 16, 2011 (DI 84), is hereby amended to clarify the inclusion of both motions to dismiss. It is recommended that: (1) Defendants motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction (DI 63) pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6) be DENIED. (2)Defendants motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim (DI 63 and 69) under F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6), under F.R.C.P. 8 and 9, and pursuant to the Private Securities Litigation Reform Act and 10(b), 14(a) and 20(a) of the Securities Act of 1934 be DENIED. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 9/29/2011. (cak)
September 28, 2011 Filing 104 Official Transcript of Telephone Conference held on September 23, 2011 before Judge Mary Pat Thynge. Court Reporter Renee Ewing of Veritext, Telephone (302) 571-0510. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/19/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/31/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/27/2011. (bpg)
September 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORAL ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the Oral Argument scheduled for 10/5/11 at 10:30 AM is hereby rescheduled to begin at 9:30 AM on 10/5/11. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/28/11. (ntl)
September 26, 2011 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Robert W. Brownlie for Heckmann Corporation added for electronic noticing. (els)
September 23, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mary Pat Thynge - A Telephone Conference regarding a discovery dispute was held on 9/23/2011. (Court Reporter Renee with Veritex.) (nms)
September 16, 2011 Filing 102 Letter to Magistrate Judge Thynge from Daniel A. Dreisbach regarding Letter Brief. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, Part 1, #3 Exhibit B, Part 2, #4 Exhibit B, Part 3, #5 Exhibit B, Part 4)(Dreisbach, Daniel)
September 15, 2011 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Kimberly A. Justice for Matthew H. Haberkorn added for electronic noticing. (rbe)
September 12, 2011 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #101 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Kimbely A. Justice. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 9/9/2011. (cak)
September 9, 2011 Filing 101 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kimberly A. Justice of Kessler Topaz Meltzer & Check, LLP to represent Lead Plaintiff and the Proposed Class - filed by Matthew H. Haberkorn. Motions referred to Mary Pat Thynge.(deLeeuw, Peter)
September 8, 2011 Filing 100 Official Transcript of Telephone Conference held on August 25, 2011 before Judge Mary Pat Thynge. Court Reporter Gloria D'Amore of Veritext Reporting, Telephone (302) 571-0510. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/29/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/11/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/7/2011. (bpg)
September 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Court will hear argument on the pending motions on October 5, 2011 beginning at 10:30 a.m. Each side will be allocated up to one (1) hour to present its argument. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/8/11. (ntl)
September 7, 2011 Filing 98 Letter to The Honorable Mary Pat Thynge from Co-Lead Counsel Kessler Topaz Meltzer & Check, LLP and Rosenthal, Monhait & Goddess, P.A. regarding PSLRA Discovery Stay - re #93 Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(deLeeuw, Peter)
September 7, 2011 Filing 97 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Lead Plaintiffs Reply Brief In Further Support Of Motion For Leave To Serve Process By Alternative Means (D.I. 95); Letter To The Honorable Mary Pat Thynge From P. Bradford Deleeuw Regarding Lead Plaintiffs Motion For Leave To Serve Process By Alternative Means (D.I. 96) by Matthew H. Haberkorn re #96 Letter, #95 Reply Brief (deLeeuw, Peter)
September 6, 2011 Filing 96 Letter to The Honorable Mary Pat Thynge from P. Bradford deLeeuw regarding Lead Plaintiffs Motion For Leave To Serve Process By Alternative Means - re #89 MOTION Leave to Serve Process by Alternative Means LEAD PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE PROCESS BY ALTERNATIVE MEANS. (deLeeuw, Peter)
September 6, 2011 Filing 95 REPLY BRIEF re #89 MOTION Leave to Serve Process by Alternative Means, filed by Matthew H. Haberkorn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(deLeeuw, Peter) Modified on 9/7/2011 (nms).
August 26, 2011 Filing 94 Joint RESPONSE to Motion re #89 MOTION Leave to Serve Process by Alternative Means LEAD PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE PROCESS BY ALTERNATIVE MEANS filed by Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kenneth J. Nachbar, #2 Declaration of Israel Dahan)(Nachbar, Kenneth)
August 26, 2011 Pro Hac Vice Attorneys Meredith Lambert and Richard A. Russo, Jr for Matthew H. Haberkorn added for electronic noticing. (nms)
August 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER the transcript of the discussions and rulings during the 8/25/2011 teleconference shall serve as the Order of the Court in this matter. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 8/25/2011. (cak)
August 25, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mary Pat Thynge - A Telephone Conference regarding Status and Scheduling was held on 8/25/2011. (Court Reporter Gloria D'Amore (Veritex).) (nms)
August 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER Setting Teleconference (Plaintiff's counsel to initiate the call): A Telephone Conference is set for 8/25/2011 at 11:00 AM before Judge Mary Pat Thynge to discuss the status of the case and the schedule. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 8/15/2011. (cak)
August 15, 2011 Filing 91 DECLARATION of Sharan Nirmul re #89 MOTION Leave to Serve Process by Alternative Means, by Matthew H. Haberkorn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L)(deLeeuw, Peter) Modified on 8/16/2011 (nms).
August 15, 2011 Filing 90 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #89 MOTION Leave to Serve Process by Alternative Means, filed by Matthew H. Haberkorn.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 9/1/2011. (deLeeuw, Peter) Modified on 8/16/2011 (nms).
August 15, 2011 Filing 89 MOTION Leave to Serve Process by Alternative Means - filed by Matthew H. Haberkorn. Motions referred to Mary Pat Thynge.(deLeeuw, Peter) Modified on 8/16/2011 (nms).
August 2, 2011 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #88 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Richard A. Russo, Jr. and Meredith L. Lambert filed by Matthew H. Haberkorn. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 8/2/2011. (nms)
August 1, 2011 Filing 88 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Richard A. Russo, Jr. and Meredith L. Lambert - filed by Matthew H. Haberkorn. Motions referred to Mary Pat Thynge.(deLeeuw, Peter)
July 19, 2011 Filing 87 RESPONSE TO OBJECTIONS by Matthew H. Haberkorn re #85 Objection to Report and Recommendations [LEAD PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO THE OBJECTIONS TO MAGISTRATE MARY PAT THYNGES REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION ON THE MOTIONS TO DISMISS BY DEFENDANTS HECKMANN CORPORATION, RICHARD J. HECKMANN, JAMES DANFORTH QUAYLE, ALFRED E. OSBORNE, JR., LOU HOLTZ, DONALD G. EZZELL, AND CHINA WATER AND DRINKS, INC.]. (deLeeuw, Peter)
July 11, 2011 Filing 86 NOTICE of Firm Name Change by Matthew H. Haberkorn (deLeeuw, Peter)
July 5, 2011 Filing 85 OBJECTION to #84 Report and Recommendations on Motion to Dismiss by China Water and Drinks, Inc., Donald G. Ezzell, Richard J. Heckmann, Heckmann Corporation, Lou Holtz, Alfred E. Osborne, Jr, James Danforth Quayle. (Dreisbach, Daniel)
June 16, 2011 Filing 84 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #63 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Person, Motion To Dismiss of Defendants Richard J. Heckmann, James Danforth Quayle, Alfred E. Osborne, Jr., Lou L. Holtz and Donald G. Ezzell filed by Heckmann Corporation. Please note that when filing Objections pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b)(2), briefing consists solely of the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages) and the Response to the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages). No further briefing shall be permitted with respect to objections without leave of the Court. Objections to R&R due by 7/5/2011. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 6/16/2011. (cak)
March 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 83 MEMORANDUM ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for #51 Report and Recommendation -- Denying #15 Motion to Transfer Case filed by Heckmann Corporation. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/31/11. (ntl)
February 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 82 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER Haberkorn has not satisfied the PSLRA requirements of necessity or undue prejudice and particularity to warrant lifting the automatic stay. Therefore, in light of the findings herein, his motion to serve an interrogatory on the Company and preservation subpoenas on third parties #57 is denied. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 2/28/2011. (cak)
February 22, 2011 Filing 81 REQUEST for Oral Argument by Matthew H. Haberkorn re #63 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Person, and #69 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . (deLeeuw, Peter) Modified on 2/23/2011 (nms).
February 18, 2011 Filing 80 REPLY BRIEF re #63 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Person, filed by China Water and Drinks, Inc., Donald G. Ezzell, Richard J. Heckmann, Heckmann Corporation, Lou Holtz, Alfred E. Osborne, Jr, James Danforth Quayle. (Grivner, Geoffrey) Modified on 2/22/2011 (nms).
February 16, 2011 Filing 79 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from P. Bradford deLeeuw - re #51 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #15 MOTION to Transfer Case to Central District of California Eastern Division filed by Heckmann Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(deLeeuw, Peter) Modified on 2/17/2011 (nms).
February 15, 2011 Filing 78 STIPULATION and [Proposed Order Extending Page Limit of Defendats' Reply Breif in Support of #63 Motions to Dismiss, by China Water and Drinks, Inc., Donald G. Ezzell, Richard J. Heckmann, Heckmann Corporation, Lou Holtz, Alfred E. Osborne, Jr, James Danforth Quayle. (Grivner, Geoffrey) Modified on 2/16/2011 (nms).
February 15, 2011 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #78 Stipulation and Order extending page limit of defendants' reply brief in support of motions to dismiss. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 2/15/2011. (cak)
January 28, 2011 Filing 77 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #63 MOTION to Dismiss, #72 MOTION Judicial Notice re #63 MOTION to Dismiss, and #69 MOTION to Dismiss, filed by Matthew H. Haberkorn.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 2/7/2011. (deLeeuw, Peter) Modified on 1/31/2011 (nms).
January 24, 2011 Filing 76 STIPULATION And Proposed Order Permitting Lead Plaintiff to File a Single Omnibus Answering Brief in Response to Defendants Motions to Dismiss - filed by Matthew H. Haberkorn. Motions referred to Mary Pat Thynge.(deLeeuw, Peter) Modified on 1/25/2011 (nms).
December 13, 2010 Filing 75 DECLARATION re #74 Reply Brief, by Matthew H. Haberkorn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-B)(Nirmul, Sharan) Modified on 12/14/2010 (nms).
December 13, 2010 Filing 74 REPLY BRIEF re #57 MOTION to Lift Stay of Discovery Under PSLRA filed by Matthew H. Haberkorn. (Nirmul, Sharan)
December 11, 2010 Filing 73 DECLARATION Richard J. Heckmann re #63 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Person, by Heckmann Corporation. (Dreisbach, Daniel) Modified on 12/13/2010 (nms).
December 10, 2010 Filing 72 MOTION Judicial Notice re #63 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Person, and #69 MOTION to Dismiss - filed by Heckmann Corporation. Motions referred to Mary Pat Thynge.(Dreisbach, Daniel) Modified on 12/13/2010 (nms).
December 10, 2010 Filing 71 DECLARATION Veronica L. Jackson re #63 MOTION to Dismiss, by Heckmann Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - L)(Dreisbach, Daniel) Modified on 12/13/2010 (nms).
December 10, 2010 Filing 70 MEMORANDUM in Support re #69 MOTION to Dismiss, filed by Heckmann Corporation.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 12/30/2010. (Dreisbach, Daniel) Modified on 12/13/2010 (nms).
December 10, 2010 Filing 69 MOTION to Dismiss - filed by Heckmann Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Motions referred to Mary Pat Thynge.(Dreisbach, Daniel) Modified on 12/13/2010 (nms).
December 10, 2010 Filing 68 DECLARATION of Lou L. Holtz re #63 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Person, by Heckmann Corporation. (Dreisbach, Daniel) Modified on 12/13/2010 (nms).
December 10, 2010 Filing 67 DECLARATION of James Danforth Quayle re #63 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Person, by Heckmann Corporation. (Dreisbach, Daniel) Modified on 12/13/2010 (nms).
December 10, 2010 Filing 66 DECLARATION of Donald G. Ezzell re #63 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Person, by Heckmann Corporation. (Dreisbach, Daniel) Modified on 12/13/2010 (nms).
December 10, 2010 Filing 65 DECLARATION of Alfred E. Osborne, Jr. re #63 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Person, by Heckmann Corporation. (Dreisbach, Daniel) Modified on 12/13/2010 (nms).
December 10, 2010 Filing 64 MEMORANDUM in Support re #63 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Person, filed by Heckmann Corporation.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 12/30/2010. (Dreisbach, Daniel) Modified on 12/13/2010 (nms).
December 10, 2010 Filing 63 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Person - filed by Heckmann Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Motions referred to Mary Pat Thynge.(Dreisbach, Daniel) Modified on 12/13/2010 (nms).
December 8, 2010 Summons Issued as to Xu Hong Bin on 12/8/2010. (rbe)
December 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER Order addressing Judge Thynge's procedures for discovery disputes. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 12/3/2010. (cak)
December 2, 2010 Filing 61 DECLARATION of Robert W. Brownlie re #60 Answering Brief in Opposition to #57 Motion to Lift Stay of Discovery Under PSLRA, by Heckmann Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-2)(Grivner, Geoffrey) Modified on 12/3/2010 (nms).
December 2, 2010 Filing 60 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #57 MOTION to Lift Stay of Discovery Under PSLRA, filed by Heckmann Corporation.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 12/13/2010. (Grivner, Geoffrey) Modified on 12/3/2010 (nms).
November 16, 2010 Due to a calculation error in CM/ECF, the following deadline has been reset in accordance with Rule 6. If a different Briefing Schedule has already been approved, it will remain in effect: DI #57 MOTION to Lift Stay of Discovery Under PSLRA - Answering Brief due 12/2/2010 per Local Rules. (maw)
November 12, 2010 Filing 59 DECLARATION of Sharan Nirmul re #58 Opening Brief in Support, #57 MOTION to Lift Stay of Discovery Under PSLRA, by Matthew H. Haberkorn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exs. A-M)(Nirmul, Sharan) Modified on 11/15/2010 (nms).
November 12, 2010 Filing 58 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #57 MOTION to Lift Stay of Discovery Under PSLRA filed by Matthew H. Haberkorn.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 11/29/2010. (Nirmul, Sharan)
November 12, 2010 Filing 57 MOTION to Lift Stay of Discovery Under PSLRA - filed by Matthew H. Haberkorn. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Motions referred to Mary Pat Thynge.(Nirmul, Sharan)
November 11, 2010 Filing 56 RESPONSE TO OBJECTIONS by Matthew H. Haberkorn re #51 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #15 MOTION to Transfer Case to Central District of California Eastern Division filed by Heckmann Corporation. Please note that when filing Objections pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b)(2), briefing consistREPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #15 MOTION to Transfer Case to Central District of California Eastern Division filed by Heckmann Corporation. Please note that when filing Objections pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b)(2), briefing consistREPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #15 MOTION to Transfer Case to Central District of California Eastern Division filed by Heckmann Corporation. Please note that when filing Objections pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b)(2), briefing consist, #54 Objection to Report and Recommendations, [Lead Plaintiffs Response To Defendant Heckmann Corporations Objections To Magistrate Thynges Report And Recommendation On Motion To Transfer Venue]. (deLeeuw, Peter)
November 5, 2010 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #55 Stipulation and Order for Extension of Briefing Schedule on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 11/5/2010. (cak) Answering Brief Deadline: 1/28/2011. Reply Brief Deadline: 2/18/2011.
November 4, 2010 Filing 55 MOTION for Extension of Time to [Stipulation and Order for Extension of Briefing Schedule on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss] - filed by Donald G. Ezzell, Richard J. Heckmann, Heckmann Corporation, Lou Holtz, Alfred E. Osborne, Jr, James Danforth Quayle. Motions referred to Mary Pat Thynge.(Grivner, Geoffrey)
October 25, 2010 Filing 54 OBJECTION to #51 Report and Recommendations on Motion to Transfer Venue, by Xu Hong Bin, China Water and Drinks, Inc., Donald G. Ezzell, Richard J. Heckmann, Heckmann Corporation, Lou Holtz, Alfred E. Osborne, Jr, James Danforth Quayle. (Grivner, Geoffrey) Modified on 10/26/2010 (nms).
October 14, 2010 Filing 53 SUMMONS Returned Executed by HEK Investor Group, Richard P. Gielata, Matthew H. Haberkorn. China Water and Drinks, Inc. served on 10/14/2010, answer due 11/4/2010. (deLeeuw, Peter)
October 14, 2010 Summons Issued as to China Water and Drinks, Inc. on 10/14/2010. (rwc)
October 8, 2010 Filing 52 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Xu Hong Bin, Donald G. Ezzell, Richard J. Heckmann, Heckmann Corporation, Lou Holtz, Alfred E. Osborne, Jr, James Danforth Quayle, China Water and Drinks, Inc.- filed by Matthew H. Haberkorn.(deLeeuw, Peter)
October 6, 2010 Filing 51 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #15 MOTION to Transfer Case to Central District of California Eastern Division filed by Heckmann Corporation be DENIED. Please note that when filing Objections pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b)(2), briefing consists solely of the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages) and the Response to the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages). No further briefing shall be permitted with respect to objections without leave of the Court Objections to R&R due by 10/25/2010. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 10/6/2010. (cak)
August 24, 2010 Filing 50 Official Transcript of Status Conference held on 08-12-10 before Judge Mary Pat Thygne. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leonard A. Dibbs. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/14/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/24/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/22/2010. (lad)
August 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER Granting #48 STIPULATION And Proposed Order Governing the Filing of Lead Plaintiffs Amended Class Action Complaint and Briefing of Defendants Motion(s) to Dismiss, filed by Matthew H. Haberkorn, (Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/8/2010, Defendants Motion(s) to Dismiss Amended Complaint with Opening Brief(s) due by 11/8/2010, Answer Brief(s) to Motion(s) to Dismiss due by 12/8/2010, Reply Brief(s) to Motion(s) to Dismiss due by 12/22/2010)(see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 8/24/2010. (nms)
August 23, 2010 Filing 48 STIPULATION And Proposed Order Governing the Filing of Lead Plaintiffs Amended Class Action Complaint and Briefing of Defendants Motion(s) to Dismiss - filed by Matthew H. Haberkorn. (deLeeuw, Peter) Modified on 8/24/2010 (nms).
August 18, 2010 Case reassigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rwc)
August 17, 2010 Filing 47 Letter to Magistrate Judge Mary Pat Thynge from Geoffrey G. Grivner regarding Consent to Jurisdiction re #22 MOTION to Dismiss, and #15 MOTION to Transfer Case to Central District of California Eastern Division. (Grivner, Geoffrey) Modified on 9/17/2010 (nms).
August 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting #33 Motion to Appoint Counsel - Matthew Haberkorn is lead plaintiff and approving lead plaintiff's selection of lead counsel. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 8/12/10. (ntl)
August 12, 2010 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mary Pat Thynge - Telephone Conference held on 8/12/2010. (Court Reporter L. Dibbs.) (ntl)
August 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Order Setting Teleconference: Telephone Conference set for 8/12/2010 at 9:30 AM before Judge Mary Pat Thynge to discuss the status of the case. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 8/6/2010. (cak)
July 27, 2010 Filing 44 Letter to The Honorable Mary Pat Thynge from P. Bradford deLeeuw - re #33 MOTION For Appointment As Lead Plaintiff And For Approval Of Lead Plaintiffs Selection Of Lead Counsel, and #15 MOTION to Transfer Case to Central District of California Eastern Division. (Attachments: #1 Enclosure 1, #2 Enclosure 2)(deLeeuw, Peter) Modified on 9/17/2010 (nms).
July 23, 2010 Filing 43 DECLARATION re #33 MOTION to Appoint Counsel [Motion Of Matthew Haberkorn For Appointment As Lead Plaintiff And For Approval Of Lead Plaintiffs Selection Of Lead Counsel] MOTION to Appoint Counsel [Motion Of Matthew Haberkorn For Appointment As Lead Plaintiff And For Approval Of Lead Plaintiffs Selection Of Lead Counsel], #42 Answering Brief in Opposition, [Declaration Of P. Bradford deLeeuw In Support Of Matthew Haberkorns Answering Brief In Response To The HEK Investor Groups Motion For Appointment As Lead Plaintiff And Approval Of Selection Of Counsel] by Matthew H. Haberkorn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(deLeeuw, Peter)
July 23, 2010 Filing 42 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #30 MOTION Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Counsel [Matthew Haberkorns Answering Brief In Response To The Hek Investor Groups Motion For Appointment As Lead Plaintiff And Approval Of Selection Of Counsel] filed by Matthew H. Haberkorn.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 8/2/2010. (deLeeuw, Peter)
July 23, 2010 Filing 41 NOTICE of Notice of Withdrawal of the Hek Investor Group's Motion for appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Counsel by Richard J. Heckmann (Brennecke, Sean)
July 23, 2010 Filing 40 REPLY BRIEF re #15 Motion to Transfer, filed by Heckmann Corporation. (Grivner, Geoffrey) Modified on 7/27/2010 (nms).
July 16, 2010 Filing 39 DECLARATION re #38 Answering Brief in Opposition, Declaration of P. Bradford deLeeuw in Support of Plaintiffs Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants Motion to Transfer by Richard P. Gielata. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-J to Declaration of P. Bradford deLeeuw in Support of Plaintiffs Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants Motion to Transfer)(deLeeuw, Peter)
July 16, 2010 Filing 38 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Transfer Case to Central District of California Eastern Division Plaintiffs Memorandum In Opposition To Defendants Motion To Transfer filed by Richard P. Gielata.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 7/26/2010. (deLeeuw, Peter)
July 13, 2010 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #37 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to Motion to Transfer (D.I. 15) to 07/16/10 -- Set Briefing Schedule: re #15 MOTION to Transfer Case to Central District of California Eastern Division (Answering Brief due 7/16/2010). Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 7/13/10. (ntl)
July 13, 2010 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #29 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME: Briefing Schedule on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss is stayed until 30 days after lead plaintiff is appointed. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 7/13/10. (ntl)
July 8, 2010 Filing 37 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Response to Motion to Transfer (D.I. 15) to 07/16/10 - filed by Richard P. Gielata. (deLeeuw, Peter)
July 6, 2010 Filing 36 NOTICE OF MOTION by Matthew H. Haberkorn re #33 MOTION to Appoint Counsel [Motion Of Matthew Haberkorn For Appointment As Lead Plaintiff And For Approval Of Lead Plaintiffs Selection Of Lead Counsel] MOTION to Appoint Counsel [Motion Of Matthew Haberkorn For Appointment As Lead Plaintiff And For Approval Of Lead Plaintiffs Selection Of Lead Counsel] ; (deLeeuw, Peter)
July 6, 2010 Filing 35 DECLARATION re #33 MOTION to Appoint Counsel [Motion Of Matthew Haberkorn For Appointment As Lead Plaintiff And For Approval Of Lead Plaintiffs Selection Of Lead Counsel] MOTION to Appoint Counsel [Motion Of Matthew Haberkorn For Appointment As Lead Plaintiff And For Approval Of Lead Plaintiffs Selection Of Lead Counsel] [Declaration Of P. Bradford Deleeuw In Support Of The Motion Of Matthew Haberkorn For Appointment As Lead Plaintiff And For Approval Of Lead Plaintiffs Selection Of Lead Counsel] by Matthew H. Haberkorn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(deLeeuw, Peter)
July 6, 2010 Filing 34 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #33 MOTION Of Matthew Haberkorn For Appointment As Lead Plaintiff And For Approval Of Lead Plaintiffs Selection Of Lead Counsel, filed by Matthew H. Haberkorn.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 7/23/2010. (deLeeuw, Peter) Modified on 9/20/2010 (nms).
July 6, 2010 Filing 33 MOTION Of Matthew Haberkorn For Appointment As Lead Plaintiff And For Approval Of Lead Plaintiffs Selection Of Lead Counsel - filed by Matthew H. Haberkorn. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Motions referred to Mary Pat Thynge.(deLeeuw, Peter) Modified on 9/20/2010 (nms).
July 6, 2010 Filing 32 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #30 MOTION Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Counsel filed by HEK Investor Group.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 7/23/2010. (Brennecke, Sean)
July 6, 2010 Filing 31 DECLARATION re #30 MOTION Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Counsel by HEK Investor Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E, #2 Exhibit F)(Brennecke, Sean)
July 6, 2010 Filing 30 MOTION Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Counsel - filed by HEK Investor Group. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting the HEK Investor Group's Motion for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Counsel, #2 Notice of Motion)Motions referred to Mary Pat Thynge.(Brennecke, Sean)
July 2, 2010 Filing 29 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Briefing Schedule on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss to 30 days after lead plaintiff is appointed - filed by Donald G. Ezzell, Richard J. Heckmann, Heckmann Corporation, Lou Holtz, Alfred E. Osborne, Jr, James Danforth Quayle. (Grivner, Geoffrey)
June 25, 2010 Filing 28 DECLARATION re #22 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Person ALFRED E. ORBORNE, JR. by Donald G. Ezzell, Richard J. Heckmann, Heckmann Corporation, Lou Holtz, Alfred E. Osborne, Jr, James Danforth Quayle. (Grivner, Geoffrey)
June 25, 2010 Filing 27 DECLARATION re #22 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Person by Donald G. Ezzell, Richard J. Heckmann, Heckmann Corporation, Lou Holtz, Alfred E. Osborne, Jr, James Danforth Quayle. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Part 1), #2 Exhibit A (Part 2), #3 Exhibit A (Part 3), #4 Exhibit B & C)(Grivner, Geoffrey)
June 25, 2010 Filing 26 DECLARATION re #22 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Person by Donald G. Ezzell, Richard J. Heckmann, Heckmann Corporation, Lou Holtz, Alfred E. Osborne, Jr, James Danforth Quayle. (Grivner, Geoffrey)
June 25, 2010 Filing 25 DECLARATION re #22 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Person by Donald G. Ezzell, Richard J. Heckmann, Heckmann Corporation, Lou Holtz, Alfred E. Osborne, Jr, James Danforth Quayle. (Grivner, Geoffrey)
June 25, 2010 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM in Support re #22 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Person filed by Donald G. Ezzell, Richard J. Heckmann, Heckmann Corporation, Lou Holtz, Alfred E. Osborne, Jr, James Danforth Quayle.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 7/12/2010. (Grivner, Geoffrey)
June 25, 2010 Filing 23 NOTICE of Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Donald G. Ezzell, Richard J. Heckmann, Heckmann Corporation, Lou Holtz, Alfred E. Osborne, Jr, James Danforth Quayle re #22 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Person (Grivner, Geoffrey)
June 25, 2010 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss - filed by Donald G. Ezzell, Richard J. Heckmann, Heckmann Corporation, Lou Holtz, Alfred E. Osborne, Jr, James Danforth Quayle. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Motions referred to Mary Pat Thynge.(Grivner, Geoffrey) Modified on 9/17/2010 (nms).
June 25, 2010 Filing 21 DECLARATION re #15 MOTION to Transfer Case to Central District of California Eastern Division Robert W. Brownlie by Heckmann Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Part 1), #2 Exhibit A (Part2), #3 Exhibit A (Part 3); B (Part 1), #4 Exhibit B (Part 2))(Dreisbach, Daniel)
June 25, 2010 Filing 20 DECLARATION of Richard J. Heckmann re #15 MOTION to Transfer Case to Central District of California Eastern Division, by Heckmann Corporation. (Dreisbach, Daniel) Modified on 9/17/2010 (nms).
June 25, 2010 Filing 19 DECLARATION of Donald G. Ezzell re #15 MOTION to Transfer Case to Central District of California Eastern Division, by Heckmann Corporation. (Dreisbach, Daniel) Modified on 9/17/2010 (nms).
June 25, 2010 Filing 18 DECLARATION of Alfred E. Osborne, Jr. re #15 MOTION to Transfer Case to Central District of California Eastern Division, by Heckmann Corporation. (Dreisbach, Daniel) Modified on 9/17/2010 (nms).
June 25, 2010 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Support re #15 MOTION to Transfer Case to Central District of California Eastern Division filed by Heckmann Corporation.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 7/12/2010. (Dreisbach, Daniel)
June 25, 2010 Filing 16 NOTICE of Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Defendant's Motion to Transfer by Heckmann Corporation re #15 MOTION to Transfer Case to Central District of California Eastern Division (Dreisbach, Daniel)
June 25, 2010 Filing 15 MOTION to Transfer Case to Central District of California Eastern Division - filed by Heckmann Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Motions referred to Mary Pat Thynge.(Dreisbach, Daniel)
June 21, 2010 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richard P. Gielata. Alfred E. Osborne, Jr served on 6/12/2010, answer due 7/6/2010. (deLeeuw, Peter)
June 21, 2010 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richard P. Gielata. Lou Holtz served on 6/4/2010, answer due 6/25/2010. (deLeeuw, Peter)
June 21, 2010 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richard P. Gielata. James Danforth Quayle served on 6/6/2010, answer due 6/28/2010. (deLeeuw, Peter)
June 21, 2010 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richard P. Gielata. Donald G. Ezzell served on 6/8/2010, answer due 6/29/2010. (deLeeuw, Peter)
June 21, 2010 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richard P. Gielata. Richard J. Heckmann served on 6/8/2010, answer due 6/29/2010. (deLeeuw, Peter)
June 16, 2010 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Robert W. Brownlie filed by Heckmann Corporation, #7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Veronica L. Jackson filed by Heckmann Corporation. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 6/16/10. (ntl)
June 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SO ORDERED re #8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to ANSWER complaint to June 28, 2010 filed by Heckmann Corporation. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 6/14/2010. (cak)
June 14, 2010 Filing 8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to ANSWER complaint to June 28, 2010 - filed by Heckmann Corporation. (Dreisbach, Daniel)
June 11, 2010 Filing 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Veronica L. Jackson - filed by Heckmann Corporation. Motions referred to Mary Pat Thynge.(Dreisbach, Daniel)
June 11, 2010 Filing 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Robert W. Brownlie - filed by Heckmann Corporation. Motions referred to Mary Pat Thynge.(Dreisbach, Daniel)
June 11, 2010 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel A. Dreisbach on behalf of Heckmann Corporation (Dreisbach, Daniel)
June 11, 2010 CORRECTING ENTRY: The Clerk's Office removed the Entry of Appearance of Daniel A. Dreisbach on behalf of all defendants, to be refiled by counsel on behalf of one defendant only. (rwc)
May 24, 2010 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richard P. Gielata. Heckmann Corporation served on 5/24/2010, answer due 6/14/2010. (deLeeuw, Peter)
May 21, 2010 Summons Issued as to Lou Holtz on 5/21/2010; James Danforth Quayle on 5/21/2010. (els)
May 21, 2010 Summons Issued as to Donald G. Ezzell on 5/21/2010; Richard J. Heckmann on 5/21/2010; Heckmann Corporation on 5/21/2010; Alfred E. Osborne, Jr on 5/21/2010. (els)
May 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Mary Pat Thynge. Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 5/14/2010. (nms)
May 12, 2010 Case assigned to Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr.. Please include the initials of the Judge (JJF) after the case number on all documents filed. (bkb)
May 6, 2010 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction (ksr)
May 6, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Xu Hong Bin, Donald G. Ezzell, Richard J. Heckmann, Heckmann Corporation, Lou Holtz, Alfred E. Osborne, Dan Quayle - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0311-730634.) - filed by Richard P. Gielata. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ksr)
May 6, 2010 No Summons Issued (ksr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: Heckmann Corporation Securities Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard J. Heckmann
Represented By: Daniel A. Dreisbach
Represented By: Susan Marie Hannigan
Represented By: Geoffrey Graham Grivner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald G. Ezzell
Represented By: Daniel A. Dreisbach
Represented By: Susan Marie Hannigan
Represented By: Geoffrey Graham Grivner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Danforth Quayle
Represented By: Daniel A. Dreisbach
Represented By: Susan Marie Hannigan
Represented By: Geoffrey Graham Grivner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfred E. Osborne, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel A. Dreisbach
Represented By: Susan Marie Hannigan
Represented By: Geoffrey Graham Grivner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lou Holtz
Represented By: Daniel A. Dreisbach
Represented By: Susan Marie Hannigan
Represented By: Geoffrey Graham Grivner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xu Hong Bin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: China Water and Drinks, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel A. Dreisbach
Represented By: Susan Marie Hannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heckmann Corporation
Represented By: Daniel A. Dreisbach
Represented By: Robert W. Brownlie
Represented By: Susan Marie Hannigan
Represented By: Geoffrey Graham Grivner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Matthew H. Haberkorn
Represented By: Sharan Nirmul
Represented By: Peter Bradford deLeeuw
Represented By: Meredith Lambert
Represented By: Richard A. Russo, Jr.
Represented By: Kimberly A. Justice
Represented By: Norman M. Monhait
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard P. Gielata
Represented By: Sharan Nirmul
Represented By: Peter Bradford deLeeuw
Represented By: Norman M. Monhait
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HEK Investor Group
Represented By: Sean M. Brennecke
Represented By: Peter Bradford deLeeuw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Sullivan
Represented By: Peter Bradford deLeeuw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?