SoftView LLC v. Apple Inc. et al
Plaintiff: SoftView LLC
Defendant: Apple Inc. and AT&T Mobility LLC
Case Number: 1:2010cv00389
Filed: May 10, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Unassigned Judge
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1105 MEMORANDUM ORDER GRANTING 981 MOTION to Stay and 940 MOTION to Stay. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/4/13. (ntl)
February 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 855 MEMORANDUM ORDER resolving various discovery disputes (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 2/22/13. (ntl)
July 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 439 MEMORANDUM OPINION re pending motions to stay and motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/26/12. (ntl)
December 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 170 MEMORANDUM ORDER DENYING re 114 MOTION for Reconsideration re 106 Memorandum and Order, [Defendants' Motion For Reconsideration Regarding Plaintiff Softview's "Motion For Leave To Amend Its Complaint To Assert Claims Against Add itional infringers"] MOTION for Reconsideration re 106 Memorandum and Order, [Defendants' Motion For Reconsideration Regarding Plaintiff Softview's "Motion For Leave To Amend Its Complaint To Assert Claims Against Additional infringers"] filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, Apple Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/7/2011. (rpg)
September 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 106 MEMORANDUM ORDER: GRANTING 37 Plaintiff SoftView LLC's Motion to Dismiss and Strike Defendant Apple Inc.'s and Defendant AT&T Mobility LLC's Inequitable Conduct Defenses filed by SoftView LLC; GRANTING 61 MOTION to Amend/Correct 27 Amended Complaint filed by SoftView LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/30/11. (ntl)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SoftView LLC v. Apple Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SoftView LLC
Represented By: Steven L. Caponi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Mobility LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?