In Re: Class 8 Transmission Indirect Purchaser Antitrust Litigation
Plaintiff: Ryan Avenarius, Big Gain Inc., Carleton Transport Service, James Cordes, Rodney E. Jaeger, Meunier Enterprises LLC, Premier Produce Co. Inc., Paul Prosper, Purdy Brothers Trucking Co. Inc. and Joseph Williams
Defendant: Daimler Trucks North America LLC, Eaton Corporation, Freightliner LLC, International Truck and Engine Corporation, Kenworth Truck Co., Mack Trucks Inc., Navistar International Corporation, Navistar, Inc., Paccar Inc., Peterbilt Motors Company and Volvo Trucks North America Inc.
Case Number: 1:2011cv00009
Filed: January 5, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Sue L Robinson
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 246 ORDER granting (267) Motion for Protective Order in case 1:10-cv-00260-SLR; granting (209) Motion for Protective Order in case 1:11-cv-00009-SLR. It is further ordered that the defendants' request to stay the litigation pending the court's class certification decision is denied. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 3/30/2015. Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00260-SLR, 1:11-cv-00009-SLR(fms)
March 27, 2015 Filing 245 [SEALED] DECLARATION Trial Declaration of Russell Lamb by Ryan Avenarius, Big Gain Inc., Carleton Transport Service, James Cordes, Rodney E. Jaeger, Meunier Enterprises LLC, Premier Produce Co. Inc., Paul Prosper, Purdy Brothers Trucking Co. Inc., Joseph Williams. (Attachments: # 1 Part 2, # 2 Part 3, # 3 Part 4, # 4 Part 5, # 5 Certificate of Service)(Driscoll, Thomas)
March 25, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sue L. Robinson - Evidentiary Hearing held on 3/25/2015. (Court Reporter V. Gunning.) Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00260-SLR, 1:11-cv-00009-SLR(fms)
March 25, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sue L. Robinson - Motion Hearing held on 3/25/2015 re (209 in 1:11-cv-00009-SLR) MOTION for Protective Order filed by Eaton Corporation, (267 in 1:10-cv-00260-SLR) MOTION for Protective Order filed by Eaton Corporation. (Court Reporter V. Gunning.) Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00260-SLR, 1:11-cv-00009-SLR(nmfn)
March 23, 2015 Filing 244 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Daniel J. Boland by Mack Trucks Inc., Volvo Trucks North America Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 51 to Declaration of Daniel Boland, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 52 to Declaration of Daniel Boland, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 53 to Declaration of Daniel Boland, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 54 to Declaration of Daniel Boland, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 55 to Declaration of Daniel Boland, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 56 to Declaration of Daniel Boland, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 57 to Declaration of Daniel Boland, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 58 to Declaration of Daniel Boland, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit 59 to Declaration of Daniel Boland, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit 60 to Declaration of Daniel Boland, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit 61 to Declaration of Daniel Boland, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit 62 to Declaration of Daniel Boland, # 13 Exhibit Exhibit 63 to Declaration of Daniel Boland, # 14 Exhibit Exhibit 64 to Declaration of Daniel Boland, # 15 Exhibit Exhibit 65 to Declaration of Daniel Boland)(Levine, James Harry)
March 16, 2015 Set Hearings: A Hearing is set for 3/25/2015 at 08:45 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson. Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00260-SLR, 1:11-cv-00009-SLR(nmfn)
March 13, 2015 Filing 243 REDACTED VERSION of # 240 Declaration, by Ryan Avenarius, Big Gain Inc., Carleton Transport Service, James Cordes, Rodney E. Jaeger, Meunier Enterprises LLC, Premier Produce Co. Inc., Paul Prosper, Purdy Brothers Trucking Co. Inc., Joseph Williams. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-16, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Driscoll, Thomas)
March 13, 2015 Filing 242 REDACTED VERSION of # 239 Reply Brief, by Ryan Avenarius, Big Gain Inc., Carleton Transport Service, James Cordes, Rodney E. Jaeger, Meunier Enterprises LLC, Premier Produce Co. Inc., Paul Prosper, Purdy Brothers Trucking Co. Inc., Joseph Williams. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Driscoll, Thomas)
March 6, 2015 Filing 241 [SEALED] DECLARATION re # 239 Reply Brief, of Russell Lamb by Ryan Avenarius, Big Gain Inc., Carleton Transport Service, James Cordes, Rodney E. Jaeger, Meunier Enterprises LLC, Premier Produce Co. Inc., Paul Prosper, Purdy Brothers Trucking Co. Inc., Joseph Williams. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A-B, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Driscoll, Thomas)
March 6, 2015 Filing 240 [SEALED] DECLARATION re # 239 Reply Brief, of Gregory B. Linkh by Ryan Avenarius, Big Gain Inc., Carleton Transport Service, James Cordes, Rodney E. Jaeger, Meunier Enterprises LLC, Premier Produce Co. Inc., Paul Prosper, Purdy Brothers Trucking Co. Inc., Joseph Williams. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-16, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Driscoll, Thomas)
March 6, 2015 Filing 239 [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re # 184 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Ryan Avenarius, Big Gain Inc., Carleton Transport Service, James Cordes, Rodney E. Jaeger, Meunier Enterprises LLC, Premier Produce Co. Inc., Paul Prosper, Purdy Brothers Trucking Co. Inc., Joseph Williams. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Driscoll, Thomas)
March 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 238 ORDER, Rescheduling Hearings( The Evidentiary Hearing is rescheduled for 3/25/2015 from 09:00 AM until 4:30 p.m. in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson.). Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 3/2/2015. Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00260-SLR, 1:11-cv-00009-SLR(nmfn)
January 30, 2015 Filing 237 REDACTED VERSION of # 234 Declaration,, of Cori Gordon Moore by Daimler Trucks North America LLC, Eaton Corporation, Freightliner LLC, International Truck and Engine Corporation, Kenworth Truck Co., Mack Trucks Inc., Navistar International Corporation, Navistar, Inc., Paccar Inc., Peterbilt Motors Company, Volvo Trucks North America Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-4, # 2 Exhibit 5, # 3 Exhibit 6-7, # 4 Exhibit 8-9, # 5 Exhibit 10, # 6 Exhibit 11-12, # 7 Exhibit 13-14, # 8 Exhibit 15, # 9 Exhibit 16, # 10 Exhibit 17, # 11 Exhibit 18-31, # 12 Exhibit 32-35, # 13 Exhibit 36-38, # 14 Exhibit 39-40, # 15 Exhibit 41-44, # 16 Exhibit 45-48, # 17 Exhibit 49, # 18 Exhibit 50)(Reid, Donald)
January 30, 2015 Filing 236 REDACTED VERSION of # 233 Answering Brief in Opposition, To Indirect Purchaser Plaintiff's Motion For Class Certification by Daimler Trucks North America LLC, Eaton Corporation, Freightliner LLC, International Truck and Engine Corporation, Kenworth Truck Co., Mack Trucks Inc., Navistar International Corporation, Navistar, Inc., Paccar Inc., Peterbilt Motors Company, Volvo Trucks North America Inc.. (Reid, Donald)
January 29, 2015 Filing 235 STIPULATION Addendum to Stipulated Coordinated Confidentiality Agreement and Protective Order re # 85 Proposed Order, by Ryan Avenarius, Big Gain Inc., Carleton Transport Service, James Cordes, Rodney E. Jaeger, Meunier Enterprises LLC, Premier Produce Co. Inc., Paul Prosper, Purdy Brothers Trucking Co. Inc., Joseph Williams. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Driscoll, Thomas)
January 23, 2015 Filing 234 [SEALED] DECLARATION re # 233 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Daimler Trucks North America LLC, Eaton Corporation, Freightliner LLC, International Truck and Engine Corporation, Kenworth Truck Co., Mack Trucks Inc., Navistar International Corporation, Navistar, Inc., Paccar Inc., Peterbilt Motors Company, Volvo Trucks North America Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-12, # 2 Exhibit 13-15, # 3 Exhibit 16-20, # 4 Exhibit 21-33, # 5 Exhibit 34-44, # 6 Exhibit 45, # 7 Exhibit 46-50)(Reid, Donald)
January 23, 2015 Filing 233 [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re # 184 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Daimler Trucks North America LLC, Eaton Corporation, Freightliner LLC, International Truck and Engine Corporation, Kenworth Truck Co., Mack Trucks Inc., Navistar International Corporation, Navistar, Inc., Paccar Inc., Peterbilt Motors Company, Volvo Trucks North America Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 2/2/2015. (Reid, Donald)
December 23, 2014 Filing 232 REPLY BRIEF re # 209 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Eaton Corporation. (Reid, Donald)
December 19, 2014 Filing 231 REDACTED VERSION of # 223 Answering Brief in Opposition,, by Ryan Avenarius, Big Gain Inc., Carleton Transport Service, James Cordes, Rodney E. Jaeger, Meunier Enterprises LLC, Premier Produce Co. Inc., Paul Prosper, Purdy Brothers Trucking Co. Inc., Joseph Williams. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-6, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Driscoll, Thomas)
December 17, 2014 Filing 230 NOTICE OF SERVICE of PACCAR, Inc., Kenworth Truck Company and Peterbilt Motor Company's Supplemental Objections and Responses to IPPs' First Set of Interrogatories filed by Kenworth Truck Co., Paccar Inc., Peterbilt Motors Company.(Heisman, James)
December 17, 2014 Filing 229 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Objections and Responses to Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories. by Mack Trucks Inc., Volvo Trucks North America Inc. (Grant, M.)
December 16, 2014 Filing 228 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants PACCAR, Inc., Kenworth Truck Company, and Peterbilt Motor Companys Objections and Responses To Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs First Set of Interrogatories to PACCAR, Inc. filed by Kenworth Truck Co., Paccar Inc., Peterbilt Motors Company.(Heisman, James)
December 16, 2014 Filing 227 NOTICE of Service of Defendant Daimler Trucks North America LLCs Responses and Objections to Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs First Set of Interrogatories by Daimler Trucks North America LLC (Sensing, John)
December 15, 2014 Filing 226 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Objections And Responses To Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' First Set Of Interrogatories filed by Eaton Corporation.(Reid, Donald)
December 15, 2014 Filing 225 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Navistar International Corporation's Response to Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories to Navistar Inc., F/K/A International Truck and Engine Corporation filed by Navistar International Corporation, Navistar, Inc..(Farnan, Kelly)
December 15, 2014 Filing 224 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Omnibus Responses to Defendants' Interrogatories Served on November 7, 2014 filed by Ryan Avenarius, Big Gain Inc., Carleton Transport Service, James Cordes, Rodney E. Jaeger, Meunier Enterprises LLC, Premier Produce Co. Inc., Paul Prosper, Purdy Brothers Trucking Co. Inc., Joseph Williams.(Driscoll, Thomas)
December 12, 2014 Filing 223 [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re # 209 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Ryan Avenarius, Big Gain Inc., Carleton Transport Service, James Cordes, Rodney E. Jaeger, Meunier Enterprises LLC, Premier Produce Co. Inc., Paul Prosper, Purdy Brothers Trucking Co. Inc., Joseph Williams.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 12/22/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3 (Part A), # 4 Exhibit 3 (Part B), # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Certificate of Service)(Driscoll, Thomas)
December 12, 2014 Filing 222 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Russell Lamb on December 17, 2014 at 9:30 am filed by Daimler Trucks North America LLC, Freightliner LLC.(Sensing, John)
December 3, 2014 Filing 221 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Chad B. Holtzman, Esq. - filed by Mack Trucks Inc., Volvo Trucks North America Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Chad B. Holtzman, Esq., # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Levine, James Harry)
December 3, 2014 Filing 220 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Sara B. Richman, Esq. - filed by Mack Trucks Inc., Volvo Trucks North America Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Sara B. Richman, Esq., # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Levine, James Harry)
December 3, 2014 Filing 219 REDACTED VERSION of # 211 Exhibit to a Document, 7 and 10 by Eaton Corporation. (Reid, Donald)
December 3, 2014 CORRECTING ENTRY: D.I. 219 (Redacted Version of D.I. 211) has been removed from the docket and will be re-filed shortly. (fms)
December 3, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re # 221 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Chad B. Holtzman, Esq. filed by Mack Trucks Inc., Volvo Trucks North America Inc., # 220 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Sara B. Richman, Esq. filed by Mack Trucks Inc., Volvo Trucks North America Inc.. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 12/3/2014. (fms)
December 2, 2014 Filing 218 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Phillip Nix. on December 4, 2014 filed by Mack Trucks Inc., Volvo Trucks North America Inc..(Grant, M.)
December 2, 2014 Filing 217 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Mack Trucks Inc., Volvo Trucks North America Inc.. /AMENDED NOTICE OF DEPOSITION . (Grant, M.)
December 2, 2014 Filing 216 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Mack Trucks Inc., Volvo Trucks North America Inc.. NOTICE OF RULE 30(B)(6) DEPOSITION OF PURDY BROTHERS TRUCKING COMPANY . (Grant, M.)
December 1, 2014 Filing 215 DECLARATION re # 213 Reply to Response to Motion,, of David Sharp by Ryan Avenarius, Big Gain Inc., Carleton Transport Service, James Cordes, Rodney E. Jaeger, Meunier Enterprises LLC, Premier Produce Co. Inc., Paul Prosper, Purdy Brothers Trucking Co. Inc., Joseph Williams. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Driscoll, Thomas)
December 1, 2014 Filing 214 DECLARATION re # 213 Reply to Response to Motion,, of Lee Albert by Ryan Avenarius, Big Gain Inc., Carleton Transport Service, James Cordes, Rodney E. Jaeger, Meunier Enterprises LLC, Premier Produce Co. Inc., Paul Prosper, Purdy Brothers Trucking Co. Inc., Joseph Williams. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Driscoll, Thomas)
December 1, 2014 Filing 213 REPLY to Response to Motion re # 180 MOTION to Substitute Party: T.C. Construction Inc., and Phillip E. Nix to replace Premier Produce Co., Inc. and Joseph Williams from serving as a class representatives filed by Ryan Avenarius, Big Gain Inc., Carleton Transport Service, James Cordes, Rodney E. Jaeger, Meunier Enterprises LLC, Premier Produce Co. Inc., Paul Prosper, Purdy Brothers Trucking Co. Inc., Joseph Williams. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Driscoll, Thomas)
November 25, 2014 Filing 212 DECLARATION re # 209 MOTION for Protective Order [of Erik T. Koons] by Eaton Corporation. (Reid, Donald)
November 25, 2014 Filing 211 [SEALED] EXHIBIT re # 209 MOTION for Protective Order , # 210 Opening Brief in Support, [Exhibits 7 and 10 To Defendant Eaton Corporation's Opening Brief In Support Of Its Motion For A Protective Order] by Eaton Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Reid, Donald)
November 25, 2014 Filing 210 OPENING BRIEF in Support re # 209 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Eaton Corporation.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 12/12/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-14 Public Version [Exhibits 7 and 10 Filed Separately Under Seal])(Reid, Donald)
November 25, 2014 Filing 209 MOTION for Protective Order - filed by Eaton Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Local Rule 7.1.1 Statement)(Reid, Donald)
November 25, 2014 Filing 208 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Jeep Tharp on December 3, 2014 filed by Kenworth Truck Co., Paccar Inc., Peterbilt Motors Company.(Heisman, James)
November 24, 2014 CORRECTING ENTRY: The pdf of D.I. # 204 has been replaced with a corrected version per request of filer to include the signature blocks for counsel for all defendants. (nmfn)
November 21, 2014 Filing 207 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff TC Construction Company, Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Defendants' First Set of Interrogatories filed by Ryan Avenarius, Big Gain Inc., Carleton Transport Service, James Cordes, Rodney E. Jaeger, Meunier Enterprises LLC, Premier Produce Co. Inc., Paul Prosper, Purdy Brothers Trucking Co. Inc., Joseph Williams.(Driscoll, Thomas)
November 20, 2014 Filing 206 DECLARATION re # 204 Answering Brief in Opposition, to Plaintiffs' Motion to Substitute New Class Representatives of Catherine S. Simonsen by Daimler Trucks North America LLC, Freightliner LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-E)(Sensing, John)
November 20, 2014 Filing 205 DECLARATION re # 204 Answering Brief in Opposition, to Plaintiffs' Motion to Substitute New Class Representatives of Corey W. Roush by Daimler Trucks North America LLC, Freightliner LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-E)(Sensing, John)
November 20, 2014 Filing 204 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re # 180 MOTION to Substitute Party: T.C. Construction Inc., and Phillip E. Nix to replace Premier Produce Co., Inc. and Joseph Williams from serving as a class representatives filed by Daimler Trucks North America LLC, Freightliner LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 12/1/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-J)(Sensing, John) (Main Document 204 replaced on 11/24/2014) (nmfn, ).
November 19, 2014 Filing 203 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Meunier Enterprises LLC on November 25, 2014 filed by Eaton Corporation.(Reid, Donald)
November 19, 2014 Filing 202 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Tom Meunier on November 25, 2014 filed by Eaton Corporation.(Reid, Donald)
November 18, 2014 Filing 201 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants First Set of Interrogatories Directed to Plaintiff Ryan Avenarius, Directed to Plaintiff Big Gain Inc., Directed to Plaintiff Carleton Transport Service, Directed to Plaintiff James Cordes, Directed to Plaintiff Meunier Enterprises LLC, Directed to Premier Produce Co, Inc., and Directed to Plaintiff Paul Prosper filed by Mack Trucks Inc., Volvo Trucks North America Inc..(Grant, M.)
November 14, 2014 Filing 200 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories to Volvo Trucks North America, Inc. and Mack Trucks, Inc. filed by Ryan Avenarius, Big Gain Inc., Carleton Transport Service, James Cordes, Rodney E. Jaeger, Meunier Enterprises LLC, Premier Produce Co. Inc., Paul Prosper, Purdy Brothers Trucking Co. Inc., Joseph Williams.(Driscoll, Thomas)
November 14, 2014 Filing 199 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories to Paccar Inc. filed by Ryan Avenarius, Big Gain Inc., Carleton Transport Service, James Cordes, Rodney E. Jaeger, Meunier Enterprises LLC, Premier Produce Co. Inc., Paul Prosper, Purdy Brothers Trucking Co. Inc., Joseph Williams.(Driscoll, Thomas)
November 14, 2014 Filing 198 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories to Navistar Inc., f/k/a International Truck and Engine Corporation filed by Ryan Avenarius, Big Gain Inc., Carleton Transport Service, James Cordes, Rodney E. Jaeger, Meunier Enterprises LLC, Premier Produce Co. Inc., Paul Prosper, Purdy Brothers Trucking Co. Inc., Joseph Williams.(Driscoll, Thomas)
November 14, 2014 Filing 197 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories to Eaton Corporation filed by Ryan Avenarius, Big Gain Inc., Carleton Transport Service, James Cordes, Rodney E. Jaeger, Meunier Enterprises LLC, Premier Produce Co. Inc., Paul Prosper, Purdy Brothers Trucking Co. Inc., Joseph Williams.(Driscoll, Thomas)
November 14, 2014 Filing 196 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories to Daimler Trucks North America LLC filed by Ryan Avenarius, Big Gain Inc., Carleton Transport Service, James Cordes, Rodney E. Jaeger, Meunier Enterprises LLC, Premier Produce Co. Inc., Paul Prosper, Purdy Brothers Trucking Co. Inc., Joseph Williams.(Driscoll, Thomas)
November 12, 2014 Filing 195 NOTICE to Take Deposition of T.C. Construction Inc. on December 3, 2014 filed by Kenworth Truck Co., Paccar Inc., Peterbilt Motors Company. (Attachments: # 1 Subpoena, # 2 Exhibit A to Subpoena)(Heisman, James)
November 10, 2014 Filing 194 REDACTED VERSION of # 187 Declaration, of Russell Lamb by Ryan Avenarius, Big Gain Inc., Carleton Transport Service, James Cordes, Rodney E. Jaeger, Meunier Enterprises LLC, Premier Produce Co. Inc., Paul Prosper, Purdy Brothers Trucking Co. Inc., Joseph Williams. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Appendix A, # 2 Appendix Appendix B, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Driscoll, Thomas)
November 10, 2014 Filing 193 REDACTED VERSION of # 186 Declaration,,,,, of Lee Albert by Ryan Avenarius, Big Gain Inc., Carleton Transport Service, James Cordes, Rodney E. Jaeger, Meunier Enterprises LLC, Premier Produce Co. Inc., Paul Prosper, Purdy Brothers Trucking Co. Inc., Joseph Williams. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibits 2-44, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 45, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 46, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 47, # 6 Certificate of Service)(Driscoll, Thomas)
November 10, 2014 Filing 192 REDACTED VERSION of # 185 Opening Brief in Support, # 184 MOTION to Certify Class by Ryan Avenarius, Big Gain Inc., Carleton Transport Service, James Cordes, Rodney E. Jaeger, Meunier Enterprises LLC, Premier Produce Co. Inc., Paul Prosper, Purdy Brothers Trucking Co. Inc., Joseph Williams. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Driscoll, Thomas)
November 7, 2014 Filing 191 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants PACCAR, Kenworth Truck, and Peterbilt Motors Company's First Set of Interrogatories to Big Gain Inc., James Cordes, Joseph Williams, Meunier Enterprises LLC, Paul Prosper, Purdy Brothers Trucking Co., Inc., Ryan Avenarius, and Rodney Jaeger filed by Kenworth Truck Co., Paccar Inc., Peterbilt Motors Company.(Heisman, James)
November 7, 2014 Filing 190 NOTICE OF SERVICE of First Set Of Interrogatories Directed To Plaintiffs Premier Produce Co., Inc., Carleton Transport Service, Paul Prosper, Ryan Avenarius, James Cordes, Joseph Williams, Rodney F. Jaeger, Big Gain, Inc. and Purdy Brothers Trucking Co., Inc. filed by Eaton Corporation.(Reid, Donald)
November 7, 2014 Filing 189 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendant Navistar International Corporations First Set of Interrogatories Directed to Plaintiff Rodney E. Jaeger; (2) Defendant Navistar International Corporations First Set of Interrogatories Directed to Plaintiff Purdy Brothers Trucking Co., Inc.; (3) Defendant Navistar International Corporations First Set of Interrogatories Directed to Plaintiff Premier Produce Co., Inc.; (4) Defendant Navistar International Corporations First Set of Interrogatories Directed to Plaintiff Paul Prosper; (5) Defendant Navistar International Corporations First Set of Interrogatories Directed to Plaintiff Meunier Enterprises LLC; (6) Defendant Navistar International Corporations First Set of Interrogatories Directed to Plaintiff Joseph Williams; (7) Defendant Navistar International Corporations First Set of Interrogatories Directed to Plaintiff Ryan Avenarius; and (8) Defendant Navistar International Corporations First Set of Interrogatories Directed to Plaintiff Carleton Transport Service filed by Navistar International Corporation, Navistar, Inc..(Farnan, Kelly)
November 5, 2014 Filing 188 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants PACCAR, Kenworth Truck, and Peterbilt Motors Company's First Amended Notice of Deposition of Edward Carleton and First Amended Notice of Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition of Carleton Transport Service filed by Kenworth Truck Co., Paccar Inc., Peterbilt Motors Company.(Heisman, James)
November 5, 2014 CORRECTING ENTRY: The pdfs of the Notices of Subpoena found at D.I. Nos. 229, 230 and 231 in Civ. No. 10-260 and D.I. 181, 182, and 183 in Civ. No. 11-9 have been replaced with corrected versions per request of filer. The text has also been corrected. Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00260-SLR, 1:11-cv-00009-SLR(nmfn)
November 3, 2014 Filing 187 [SEALED] DECLARATION re # 185 Opening Brief in Support, # 184 MOTION to Certify Class of Russell Lamb by Ryan Avenarius, Big Gain Inc., Carleton Transport Service, James Cordes, Rodney E. Jaeger, Meunier Enterprises LLC, Premier Produce Co. Inc., Paul Prosper, Purdy Brothers Trucking Co. Inc., Joseph Williams. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A, # 2 Appendix B, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Driscoll, Thomas)
November 3, 2014 Filing 186 [SEALED] DECLARATION re # 184 MOTION to Certify Class , # 185 Opening Brief in Support, of Lee Albert by Ryan Avenarius, Big Gain Inc., Carleton Transport Service, James Cordes, Rodney E. Jaeger, Meunier Enterprises LLC, Premier Produce Co. Inc., Paul Prosper, Purdy Brothers Trucking Co. Inc., Joseph Williams. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27, # 28 Exhibit 28, # 29 Exhibit 29, # 30 Exhibit 30, # 31 Exhibit 31, # 32 Exhibit 32, # 33 Exhibit 33, # 34 Exhibit 34, # 35 Exhibit 35, # 36 Exhibit 36, # 37 Exhibit 37, # 38 Exhibit 38, # 39 Exhibit 39, # 40 Exhibit 40, # 41 Exhibit 41, # 42 Exhibit 42, # 43 Exhibit 43, # 44 Exhibit 44, # 45 Exhibit 45, # 46 Exhibit 46, # 47 Exhibit 47, # 48 Certificate of Service)(Driscoll, Thomas)
November 3, 2014 Filing 185 [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re # 184 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Ryan Avenarius, Big Gain Inc., Carleton Transport Service, James Cordes, Rodney E. Jaeger, Meunier Enterprises LLC, Premier Produce Co. Inc., Paul Prosper, Purdy Brothers Trucking Co. Inc., Joseph Williams.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 11/20/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Driscoll, Thomas)
November 3, 2014 Filing 184 MOTION to Certify Class - filed by Ryan Avenarius, Big Gain Inc., Carleton Transport Service, James Cordes, Rodney E. Jaeger, Meunier Enterprises LLC, Premier Produce Co. Inc., Paul Prosper, Purdy Brothers Trucking Co. Inc., Joseph Williams. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Driscoll, Thomas)
November 3, 2014 Filing 183 Defendants' Notice of Subpoena Ad Testificandum of Ronald Tauro on November 19, 2014 by Daimler Trucks North America LLC, Freightliner LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Sensing, John) (Main Document 231 replaced on 11/5/2014) (nmfn). Modified on 11/5/2014 (nmfn).
November 3, 2014 Filing 182 Defendants' Notice of Subpoena Ad Testificandum of Richard Tauro on November 19, 2014 by Daimler Trucks North America LLC, Freightliner LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Sensing, John) (Main Document 230 replaced on 11/5/2014) (nmfn). Modified on 11/5/2014 (nmfn).
November 3, 2014 Filing 181 Defendants' Notice of Subpoena Ad Testificandum of Frank DeJute on November 19, 2014 by Daimler Trucks North America LLC, Freightliner LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Sensing, John) (Main Document 229 replaced on 11/5/2014) (nmfn). Modified on 11/5/2014 (nmfn).
November 3, 2014 Filing 180 MOTION to Substitute Party: T.C. Construction Inc., and Phillip E. Nix to replace Premier Produce Co., Inc. and Joseph Williams from serving as a class representatives - filed by Ryan Avenarius, Big Gain Inc., Carleton Transport Service, James Cordes, Rodney E. Jaeger, Meunier Enterprises LLC, Premier Produce Co. Inc., Paul Prosper, Purdy Brothers Trucking Co. Inc., Joseph Williams. (Attachments: # 1 Averment Pursuant to Local Federal Rule of Civil Proceure 7.1.1, # 2 Declaration of Lee Albert, # 3 Text of Proposed Order, # 4 Certificate of Service)(Driscoll, Thomas)
October 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER granting (177 in 1:11-cv-00009-SLR), (225 in 1:10-cv-00260-SLR) Stipulation and Proposed Amended Scheduling Order. ORDER, Setting Hearings( An Evidentiary Hearing on the Motion for Class Certification is set for 3/24/2015 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson., An Evidentiary Hearing on the Motion for Class Certification is set for 3/25/2015 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson.) See order for further details. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 10/31/2014. Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00260-SLR, 1:11-cv-00009-SLR(nmfn)
October 30, 2014 Filing 178 Amended NOTICE of Deposition by Mack Trucks Inc., Volvo Trucks North America Inc. (Grant, M.)
October 27, 2014 Filing 177 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Amended Scheduling Order by Ryan Avenarius, Big Gain Inc., Carleton Transport Service, James Cordes, Rodney E. Jaeger, Meunier Enterprises LLC, Premier Produce Co. Inc., Paul Prosper, Purdy Brothers Trucking Co. Inc., Joseph Williams. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Driscoll, Thomas)
October 23, 2014 Filing 176 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Ryan Avenarius on November 6, 2014 at 9:00 am filed by Daimler Trucks North America LLC, Freightliner LLC.(Sensing, John)
October 9, 2014 Filing 175 Amended NOTICE of Deposition of Dave Wagner, November 6, 2014 by International Truck and Engine Corporation, Navistar International Corporation, Navistar, Inc. re # 157 Notice to Take Deposition (Farnan, Kelly)
October 9, 2014 Filing 174 Amended NOTICE of Deposition of James Cordes, November 13, 2014 by International Truck and Engine Corporation, Navistar International Corporation, Navistar, Inc. re # 156 Notice to Take Deposition (Farnan, Kelly)
October 9, 2014 Filing 173 Amended NOTICE of Deposition of Cordes, Inc., November 13, 2014 by International Truck and Engine Corporation, Navistar International Corporation, Navistar, Inc. re # 155 Notice to Take Deposition (Farnan, Kelly)
October 9, 2014 Filing 172 Amended NOTICE of Deposition of Big Gain, Inc., November 6, 2014 by International Truck and Engine Corporation, Navistar International Corporation, Navistar, Inc. re # 154 Notice to Take Deposition (Farnan, Kelly)
October 8, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re # 171 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney of Attorney David F. Taylor of Perkins Coie LLC filed by Paccar Inc., Peterbilt Motors Company, Kenworth Truck Co. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 10/8/2014. (fms)
October 7, 2014 Filing 171 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney of Attorney David F. Taylor of Perkins Coie LLC - filed by Kenworth Truck Co., Paccar Inc., Peterbilt Motors Company. (Heisman, James)
October 2, 2014 Filing 170 DECLARATION re Discovery Conference by Eaton Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Letter To The Honorable Sue L. Robinson)(Reid, Donald)
October 2, 2014 Filing 169 DECLARATION re Discovery Conference DECLARATION OF NICHOLAS GRAY by International Truck and Engine Corporation, Navistar International Corporation, Navistar, Inc.. (Farnan, Kelly)
October 2, 2014 Filing 168 DECLARATION re Discovery Conference held before Judge Sue L. Robinson on 9/23/14/Declaration of Andrew Seiple, Esq. by Paccar Inc.. (Heisman, James)
September 30, 2014 Filing 167 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Joseph Williams on 10/30/2014 filed by Mack Trucks Inc., Volvo Trucks North America Inc..(Grant, M.)
September 30, 2014 Filing 166 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Douglas Surrett on 11/03/2014 filed by Mack Trucks Inc., Volvo Trucks North America Inc..(Grant, M.)
September 30, 2014 Filing 165 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Purdy Brothers Trucking Company on 11/04/2014 filed by Mack Trucks Inc., Volvo Trucks North America Inc..(Grant, M.)
September 30, 2014 Filing 164 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Rodney Jaeger on 10/29/2014 filed by Mack Trucks Inc., Volvo Trucks North America Inc..(Grant, M.)
September 26, 2014 Filing 163 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Meunier Enterprises LLC on November 18, 2014 filed by Eaton Corporation.(Reid, Donald)
September 26, 2014 Filing 162 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Tom Meunier on November 17, 2014 filed by Eaton Corporation.(Reid, Donald)
September 26, 2014 Filing 161 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Meunier Enterprises LLC's Responses and Objections to Defendants' First Set of Interrogatories filed by Meunier Enterprises LLC.(Driscoll, Thomas)
September 23, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sue L. Robinson - Discovery Conference held on 9/23/2014. (Court Reporter V. Gunning.) Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00260-SLR, 1:11-cv-00009-SLR(nmfn)
September 17, 2014 Set Hearings: A Discovery Conference is set for 9/23/2014 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson. Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00260-SLR, 1:11-cv-00009-SLR(nmfn)
September 15, 2014 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Brian D Penny for Paul Prosper added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mas)
September 12, 2014 Filing 160 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Paul Prosper on October 29, 2014 at 9:00 am filed by Daimler Trucks North America LLC, Freightliner LLC.(Sensing, John)
September 12, 2014 Filing 159 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Ryan Avenarius on October 21, 2014 at 9:00 am filed by Daimler Trucks North America LLC, Freightliner LLC.(Sensing, John)
September 12, 2014 Filing 158 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric James Evain on behalf of Kenworth Truck Co., Paccar Inc., Peterbilt Motors Company (Evain, Eric)
September 10, 2014 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Brian Borchard for Navistar International Corporation,Brian Borchard for Navistar International Corporation added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:11-cv-00009-SLR, 1:10-cv-00260-SLR(els)
September 9, 2014 Filing 157 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Dave Wagner on October 9, 2014 filed by International Truck and Engine Corporation, Navistar International Corporation, Navistar, Inc..(Farnan, Kelly)
September 9, 2014 Filing 156 NOTICE to Take Deposition of James Cordes on October 16, 2014 filed by International Truck and Engine Corporation, Navistar International Corporation, Navistar, Inc..(Farnan, Kelly)
September 9, 2014 Filing 155 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Cordes, Inc. on October 15, 2014 filed by International Truck and Engine Corporation, Navistar International Corporation, Navistar, Inc..(Farnan, Kelly)
September 9, 2014 Filing 154 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Big Gain, Inc. on October 8, 2014 filed by International Truck and Engine Corporation, Navistar International Corporation, Navistar, Inc..(Farnan, Kelly)
September 8, 2014 Filing 153 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Brian Borchard - filed by International Truck and Engine Corporation, Navistar International Corporation, Navistar, Inc.. (Farnan, Kelly)
September 8, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re # 153 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Brian Borchard filed by Navistar International Corporation, International Truck and Engine Corporation, Navistar, Inc.. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 9/8/2014. (fms)
August 29, 2014 Filing 152 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Notice of Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition of Carleton Transport Service; Notice of Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition of Premier Produce Co., Inc.; Notice of Deposition of Ed Carleton; and Notice of Deposition of Syed A. Zaidi filed by Kenworth Truck Co., Paccar Inc., Peterbilt Motors Company.(Heisman, James)
August 21, 2014 Filing 151 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Volvo Trucks North America and Mack Trucks, Inc. on September 8, 2014 at 9:30 a.m. filed by Ryan Avenarius, Big Gain Inc., Carleton Transport Service, James Cordes, Rodney E. Jaeger, Meunier Enterprises LLC, Premier Produce Co. Inc., Paul Prosper, Purdy Brothers Trucking Co. Inc., Joseph Williams.(Driscoll, Thomas)
August 21, 2014 Filing 150 NOTICE to Take Deposition of PACCAR, Inc. on September 10, 2014 at 9:30 a.m. EST filed by Ryan Avenarius, Big Gain Inc., Carleton Transport Service, James Cordes, Rodney E. Jaeger, Meunier Enterprises LLC, Premier Produce Co. Inc., Paul Prosper, Purdy Brothers Trucking Co. Inc., Joseph Williams.(Driscoll, Thomas)
August 21, 2014 Filing 149 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Daimler Trucks North America, LLC on September 11, 2014 at 9:30 a.m. EST filed by Ryan Avenarius, Big Gain Inc., Carleton Transport Service, James Cordes, Rodney E. Jaeger, Meunier Enterprises LLC, Premier Produce Co. Inc., Paul Prosper, Purdy Brothers Trucking Co. Inc., Joseph Williams.(Driscoll, Thomas)
August 21, 2014 Filing 148 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Navistar International Corporation on September 9, 2014 at 9:30 a.m. EST filed by Ryan Avenarius, Big Gain Inc., Carleton Transport Service, James Cordes, Rodney E. Jaeger, Meunier Enterprises LLC, Premier Produce Co. Inc., Paul Prosper, Purdy Brothers Trucking Co. Inc., Joseph Williams.(Driscoll, Thomas)
August 21, 2014 Filing 147 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Gary S. Moore on September 15, 2014 at 9:30 a.m. EST filed by Ryan Avenarius, Big Gain Inc., Carleton Transport Service, James Cordes, Rodney E. Jaeger, Meunier Enterprises LLC, Premier Produce Co. Inc., Paul Prosper, Purdy Brothers Trucking Co. Inc., Joseph Williams.(Driscoll, Thomas)
August 14, 2014 Filing 146 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL re Kenworth Truck Co., Paccar Inc., Peterbilt Motors Company: Entry of appearance of attorney James D. Heisman. Attorney Francis DiGiovanni and M. Curt Lambert terminated. (Heisman, James)
August 12, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (194 in 1:10-cv-00260-SLR) (145 in 1:11-cv-00009-SLR) Stipulation and Proposed Order Regarding Class Certification Briefing. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 8/12/2014. See stipulation for details and deadlines. Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00260-SLR, 1:11-cv-00009-SLR(fms)
August 11, 2014 Filing 145 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Regarding Class Certification Briefing by Ryan Avenarius, Big Gain Inc., Carleton Transport Service, James Cordes, Rodney E. Jaeger, Meunier Enterprises LLC, Premier Produce Co. Inc., Paul Prosper, Purdy Brothers Trucking Co. Inc., Joseph Williams. (Attachments: # 1 COS)(Driscoll, Thomas)
August 11, 2014 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Jason M. Lindner,Jason Hartley for Ryan Avenarius added for electronic noticing. (dmp, )
August 7, 2014 Filing 144 NOTICE OF SERVICE of First Set Of Interrogatories Directed To Indirect Purchaser Plaintiff Meunier Enterprises LLC filed by Eaton Corporation.(Reid, Donald)
August 5, 2014 Filing 143 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Brian D. Penny, Esquire - filed by Ryan Avenarius, Big Gain Inc., Carleton Transport Service, James Cordes, Rodney E. Jaeger, Meunier Enterprises LLC, Premier Produce Co. Inc., Paul Prosper, Purdy Brothers Trucking Co. Inc., Joseph Williams. (Driscoll, Thomas)
August 5, 2014 Filing 142 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Douglas J. Bench, Esquire - filed by Ryan Avenarius, Big Gain Inc., Carleton Transport Service, James Cordes, Rodney E. Jaeger, Meunier Enterprises LLC, Premier Produce Co. Inc., Paul Prosper, Purdy Brothers Trucking Co. Inc., Joseph Williams. (Driscoll, Thomas)
August 5, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re # 142 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Douglas J. Bench, Esquire filed by Paul Prosper, Purdy Brothers Trucking Co. Inc., Big Gain Inc., James Cordes, Joseph Williams, Meunier Enterprises LLC, Rodney E. Jaeger, Carleton Transport Service, Premier Produce Co. Inc., Ryan Avenarius, # 143 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Brian D. Penny, Esquire filed by Paul Prosper, Purdy Brothers Trucking Co. Inc., Big Gain Inc., James Cordes, Joseph Williams, Meunier Enterprises LLC, Rodney E. Jaeger, Carleton Transport Service, Premier Produce Co. Inc., Ryan Avenarius. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 8/5/2014. (fms)
July 29, 2014 Filing 141 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jason S. Hartley and Jason M. Lindner - filed by Ryan Avenarius, Big Gain Inc., Carleton Transport Service, James Cordes, Rodney E. Jaeger, Meunier Enterprises LLC, Premier Produce Co. Inc., Paul Prosper, Purdy Brothers Trucking Co. Inc., Joseph Williams. (Driscoll, Thomas)
July 29, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re # 141 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jason S. Hartley and Jason M. Lindner filed by Paul Prosper, Purdy Brothers Trucking Co. Inc., Big Gain Inc., James Cordes, Joseph Williams, Meunier Enterprises LLC, Rodney E. Jaeger, Carleton Transport Service, Premier Produce Co. Inc., Ryan Avenarius. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 7/29/14. (fms)
July 28, 2014 The 7/29/2014 discovery conference is cancelled per request of counsel. Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00260-SLR, 1:11-cv-00009-SLR(nmfn)
July 18, 2014 Filing 140 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Responses and Objections to Defendants' First Set of Interrogatories - Served July 16, 2014 filed by Ryan Avenarius, Big Gain Inc., Carleton Transport Service, Rodney E. Jaeger, Purdy Brothers Trucking Co. Inc., Joseph Williams.(Driscoll, Thomas)
June 27, 2014 CORRECTING ENTRY: The text of the scheduling order entry has been modified to reflect the correct discovery conference date: A Discovery Conference is set for 7/29/2014 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson. (nmfn)
May 28, 2014 Filing 139 NOTICE of Change of Law Firm Affiliation by Kenworth Truck Company, Paccar Inc., Peterbilt Motors Company, Kenworth Truck Co. (DiGiovanni, Francis)
May 21, 2014 Filing 138 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of First Set of Interrogatories by Mack Trucks Inc., Volvo Trucks North America Inc. (Grant, M.)
May 19, 2014 Filing 137 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendants Navistar International Corporation and Navistar, Inc. f/k/a International Truck and Engine Corporations First Set of Interrogatories Directed to Plaintiff James Cordes and (2) Defendants Navistar International Corporation and Navistar, Inc. f/k/a International Truck and Engine Corporations First Set of Interrogatories Directed to Plaintiff Big Gain, Inc. filed by International Truck and Engine Corporation, Navistar International Corporation, Navistar, Inc..(Farnan, Kelly)
May 19, 2014 Filing 136 NOTICE OF SERVICE of DEFENDANTS PACCAR INC., KENWORTH TRUCK COMPANY, AND PETERBILT MOTORS COMPANYS FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES DIRECTED TO PLAINTIFF CARLETON TRANSPORT SERVICE and DEFENDANTS PACCAR INC., KENWORTH TRUCK COMPANY, AND PETERBILT MOTORS COMPANYS FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES DIRECTED TO PLAINTIFF PREMIER PRODUCE CO., INC. filed by Kenworth Truck Co., Paccar Inc., Peterbilt Motors Company.(DiGiovanni, Francis)
May 19, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re # 134 SECOND AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Case referred to the Magistrate Judge for the purpose of exploring ADR. ( Discovery due by 7/17/2015., A Discovery Conference is set for 7/29/2014 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson., A Status Conference is set for 6/24/2015 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson, Dispositive Motions due by 7/17/2015., An Oral Argument is set for 2/27/2015 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson., A Final Pretrial Conference is set for 12/10/2015 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson., A Jury Trial is set for 2/8/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson., An Oral Argument is set for 11/10/2015 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson.). Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 5/19/2014. (nmfn) Modified on 6/27/2014 (nmfn).
May 16, 2014 Filing 135 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Daimler Trucks North America LLC's First Set of Interrogatories Directed to Indirect Purchaser Plaintiff Ryan Avenarius and Defendant Daimler Trucks North America LLC's First Set of Interrogatories Directed to Indirect Purchaser Plaintiff Paul Prosper filed by Daimler Trucks North America LLC, Freightliner LLC.(Sensing, John)
May 16, 2014 Filing 134 MOTION for Scheduling Order "Stipulated Proposed Second Amended Scheduling Order" - filed by Ryan Avenarius, Big Gain Inc., Carleton Transport Service, James Cordes, Rodney E. Jaeger, Meunier Enterprises LLC, Premier Produce Co. Inc., Paul Prosper, Purdy Brothers Trucking Co. Inc., Joseph Williams. (Driscoll, Thomas)
May 12, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sue L. Robinson - Scheduling Conference held on 5/12/2014. (Court Reporter not present.) Counsel to submit the final revised proposed scheduling order to the court. Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00260-SLR, 1:11-cv-00009-SLR(nmfn)
May 6, 2014 Filing 133 NOTICE of Subpoena to Velocity Vehicle Group by Ryan Avenarius, Big Gain Inc., Carleton Transport Service, James Cordes, Rodney E. Jaeger, Meunier Enterprises LLC, Premier Produce Co. Inc., Paul Prosper, Purdy Brothers Trucking Co. Inc., Joseph Williams (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Driscoll, Thomas)
May 6, 2014 Filing 132 NOTICE of Subpoena to Interstate Truck Center by Ryan Avenarius, Big Gain Inc., Carleton Transport Service, James Cordes, Rodney E. Jaeger, Meunier Enterprises LLC, Premier Produce Co. Inc., Paul Prosper, Purdy Brothers Trucking Co. Inc., Joseph Williams (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Driscoll, Thomas)
May 6, 2014 Filing 131 NOTICE of Subpoena to Western Truck Center by Ryan Avenarius, Big Gain Inc., Carleton Transport Service, James Cordes, Rodney E. Jaeger, Meunier Enterprises LLC, Premier Produce Co. Inc., Paul Prosper, Purdy Brothers Trucking Co. Inc., Joseph Williams (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Driscoll, Thomas)
May 1, 2014 Filing 130 NOTICE of Appearance by James Harry Stone Levine on behalf of Mack Trucks Inc., Volvo Trucks North America Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Levine, James Harry)
April 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 129 Order Setting Telephonic Scheduling Conference: A Scheduling Conference is set for 5/12/2014 at 10:00 AM before Judge Sue L. Robinson. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 4/25/2014. Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00260-SLR, 1:11-cv-00009-SLR(nmfn)
April 17, 2014 Filing 128 Second MOTION for Scheduling Order "Stipulated (Proposed) Second Amended Scheduling Order" - filed by Ryan Avenarius, Big Gain Inc., Carleton Transport Service, James Cordes, Rodney E. Jaeger, Meunier Enterprises LLC, Premier Produce Co. Inc., Paul Prosper, Purdy Brothers Trucking Co. Inc., Joseph Williams. (Driscoll, Thomas)
April 10, 2014 Filing 127 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Matthew Denn as co-counsel. Reason for request: Changed Firms. (Driscoll, Thomas)
April 4, 2014 Filing 126 NOTICE of Subpoena to Truck Enterprises, Inc. by Ryan Avenarius, Big Gain Inc., Carleton Transport Service, James Cordes, Rodney E. Jaeger, Meunier Enterprises LLC, Premier Produce Co. Inc., Paul Prosper, Purdy Brothers Trucking Co. Inc., Joseph Williams (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Driscoll, Thomas)
April 4, 2014 Filing 125 NOTICE of Subpoena to Hunters Truck Sales & Service, Inc. by Ryan Avenarius, Big Gain Inc., Carleton Transport Service, James Cordes, Rodney E. Jaeger, Meunier Enterprises LLC, Premier Produce Co. Inc., Paul Prosper, Purdy Brothers Trucking Co. Inc., Joseph Williams (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Driscoll, Thomas)
April 4, 2014 Filing 124 NOTICE of Subpoena to Cascadia International LLC by Ryan Avenarius, Big Gain Inc., Carleton Transport Service, James Cordes, Rodney E. Jaeger, Meunier Enterprises LLC, Premier Produce Co. Inc., Paul Prosper, Purdy Brothers Trucking Co. Inc., Joseph Williams (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Driscoll, Thomas)
March 31, 2014 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Eric J. Weiss,Catherine S. Simonsen for Paccar Inc. added for electronic noticing. (rbe)
March 28, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re # 123 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Eric J. Weiss and Catherine S. Simonsen filed by Paccar Inc., Peterbilt Motors Company, Kenworth Truck Co. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 3/28/2014. (nmfn)
March 27, 2014 Filing 123 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Eric J. Weiss and Catherine S. Simonsen - filed by Kenworth Truck Co., Paccar Inc., Peterbilt Motors Company. (DiGiovanni, Francis)
February 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER Setting Teleconference: A Telephone Conference is set with counsel for Plaintiffs for 3/24/2014 at 10:15 AM before Judge Christopher J. Burke. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 2/27/2014. (dlk)
February 12, 2014 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Julie B. Rubenstein for Eaton Corporation,Julie B. Rubenstein for Eaton Corporation added for electronic noticing. Associated Cases: 1:11-cv-00009-SLR, 1:10-cv-00260-SLR(els)
February 11, 2014 Filing 121 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Julie B. Rubenstein - filed by Eaton Corporation. (Reid, Donald)
February 11, 2014 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Thomas L. Boeder for Paccar Inc. added for electronic noticing. (dmp, )
February 11, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re # 121 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Julie B. Rubenstein filed by Eaton Corporation. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 2/11/2014. (fms)
February 11, 2014 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Cori G. Moore for Paccar Inc. added for electronic noticing. (dmp, )
February 10, 2014 Filing 120 NOTICE of Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel by Kenworth Truck Co., Paccar Inc., Peterbilt Motors Company (DiGiovanni, Francis)
February 10, 2014 Filing 119 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Cori Gordon Moore and Thomas L. Boeder - filed by Kenworth Truck Co., Paccar Inc., Peterbilt Motors Company. (DiGiovanni, Francis)
February 10, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re # 119 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Cori Gordon Moore and Thomas L. Boeder filed by Paccar Inc., Peterbilt Motors Company, Kenworth Truck Co. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 2/10/2014. (fms)
January 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER Setting Teleconference: A Telephone Conference is set for 2/10/2014 at 10:00 AM before Judge Christopher J. Burke. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 1/28/2014. (dlk)
January 13, 2014 The discovery conference scheduled for today at 4:30 p.m. is cancelled per request of counsel. Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00260-SLR, 1:11-cv-00009-SLR(nmfn)
January 2, 2014 Filing 117 NOTICE of Subpoena to Worldwide Equipment Inc. by Ryan Avenarius, Big Gain Inc., Carleton Transport Service, James Cordes, Rodney E. Jaeger, Meunier Enterprises LLC, Premier Produce Co. Inc., Paul Prosper, Purdy Brothers Trucking Co. Inc., Joseph Williams (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Driscoll, Thomas)
January 2, 2014 Filing 116 NOTICE of Subpoena to TEC Equipment, Inc. by Ryan Avenarius, Big Gain Inc., Carleton Transport Service, James Cordes, Rodney E. Jaeger, Meunier Enterprises LLC, Premier Produce Co. Inc., Paul Prosper, Purdy Brothers Trucking Co. Inc., Joseph Williams (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Driscoll, Thomas)
January 2, 2014 Filing 115 NOTICE of Subpoena to Rush Enterprises, Inc. by Ryan Avenarius, Big Gain Inc., Carleton Transport Service, James Cordes, Rodney E. Jaeger, Meunier Enterprises LLC, Premier Produce Co. Inc., Paul Prosper, Purdy Brothers Trucking Co. Inc., Joseph Williams (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Driscoll, Thomas)
January 2, 2014 Filing 114 NOTICE of Subpoena to Roberts Truck Center by Ryan Avenarius, Big Gain Inc., Carleton Transport Service, James Cordes, Rodney E. Jaeger, Meunier Enterprises LLC, Premier Produce Co. Inc., Paul Prosper, Purdy Brothers Trucking Co. Inc., Joseph Williams (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Driscoll, Thomas)
January 2, 2014 Filing 113 NOTICE of Subpoena to Bruckner Truck Sales by Ryan Avenarius, Big Gain Inc., Carleton Transport Service, James Cordes, Rodney E. Jaeger, Meunier Enterprises LLC, Premier Produce Co. Inc., Paul Prosper, Purdy Brothers Trucking Co. Inc., Joseph Williams (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Driscoll, Thomas)
October 28, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (131 in 1:10-cv-00260-SLR) MOTION for Scheduling Order /Stipulated (Proposed) Amended Scheduling Order , (112 in 1:11-cv-00009-SLR) MOTION for Scheduling Order /Stipulated (Proposed) Amended Scheduling Order SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Discovery due by 12/5/2014., A Discovery Conference is set for 1/13/2014 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson., Dispositive Motions due by 12/12/2014.) SEE ORDERS FOR FURTHER DETAILS. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 10/28/2013. Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00260-SLR, 1:11-cv-00009-SLR(nmfn)
October 23, 2013 Filing 112 MOTION for Scheduling Order /Stipulated (Proposed) Amended Scheduling Order - filed by Mack Trucks Inc., Volvo Trucks North America Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Grant, M.)
October 17, 2013 The discovery conference originally set for 10/22/2013 at 4:30 p.m. has been cancelled per request of counsel. The conference will be rescheduled. Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00260-SLR, 1:11-cv-00009-SLR(nmfn)
September 18, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re # 111 Stipulation Regarding Expert Discovery, filed by Big Gain Inc., Meunier Enterprises LLC, Rodney E. Jaeger, Peterbilt Motors Company, Navistar, Inc., Carleton Transport Service, Freightliner LLC, Premier Produce Co. Inc., Daimler Trucks North America LLC, Volvo Trucks North America Inc., Paul Prosper, Purdy Brothers Trucking Co. Inc., James Cordes, Joseph Williams, International Truck and Engine Corporation, Eaton Corporation, Kenworth Truck Co., Navistar International Corporation, Paccar Inc., Mack Trucks Inc., Ryan Avenarius. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 9/18/2013. (nmfn)
September 13, 2013 Filing 111 STIPULATION and (Proposed) Order Regarding Expert Discovery by Ryan Avenarius, Big Gain Inc., Carleton Transport Service, James Cordes, Daimler Trucks North America LLC, Eaton Corporation, Freightliner LLC, International Truck and Engine Corporation, Rodney E. Jaeger, Kenworth Truck Co., Mack Trucks Inc., Meunier Enterprises LLC, Navistar International Corporation, Navistar, Inc., Paccar Inc., Peterbilt Motors Company, Premier Produce Co. Inc., Paul Prosper, Purdy Brothers Trucking Co. Inc., Volvo Trucks North America Inc., Joseph Williams. (Zeldin, Jessica)
August 2, 2013 Filing 110 NOTICE of Firm Name Change by Ryan Avenarius, Big Gain Inc., Carleton Transport Service, James Cordes, Rodney E. Jaeger, Meunier Enterprises LLC, Premier Produce Co. Inc., Paul Prosper, Purdy Brothers Trucking Co. Inc., Joseph Williams (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Driscoll, Thomas)
July 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER Setting Teleconference: A Telephone Conference is set for 10/7/2013 at 11:30 AM before Judge Christopher J. Burke. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 7/25/2013. (dlk)
June 25, 2013 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sue L. Robinson - Discovery Conference held on 6/25/2013. (Court Reporter V. Gunning.) Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00260-SLR, 1:11-cv-00009-SLR(nmfn)
June 24, 2013 The 6/25/2013 discovery conference will be held in Courtroom 2A at 3:00 p.m. Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00260-SLR, 1:11-cv-00009-SLR(nmfn)
June 24, 2013 Reset Hearings: The Discovery Conference is reset for 6/25/2013 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson. Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00260-SLR, 1:11-cv-00009-SLR(nmfn)
June 12, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (126 in 1:10-cv-00260-SLR, 108 in 1:11-cv-00009-SLR) Electronic Discovery Protocol Stipulation filed by Navistar International Corporation, International Truck and Engine Corporation, Navistar, Inc.. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 6/12/2013. Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00260-SLR, 1:11-cv-00009-SLR(fms)
June 10, 2013 Filing 108 STIPULATION re: ELECTRONIC DISCOVERY PROTOCOL STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER by International Truck and Engine Corporation, Navistar International Corporation, Navistar, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Farnan, Kelly)
May 24, 2013 Filing 107 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Barak A. Bassman and Michael J. Hartman - filed by Mack Trucks Inc., Volvo Trucks North America Inc.. (Grant, M.)
May 24, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re # 107 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Barak A. Bassman and Michael J. Hartman filed by Mack Trucks Inc., Volvo Trucks North America Inc.. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 5/24/2013. (fms)
May 21, 2013 Filing 106 NOTICE OF SERVICE of PACCARs Objections and Responses to Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs First Set of Requests for Production to Each OEM by Kenworth Truck Co., Paccar Inc., Peterbilt Motors Company.(DiGiovanni, Francis)
May 21, 2013 Filing 105 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Objections and Responses to Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Production to each OEM and Objections and Responses to Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' first Set of Requests for Production to all OEMS by Mack Trucks Inc., Volvo Trucks North America Inc. (Grant, M.)
May 21, 2013 Filing 104 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Eaton Corporation's Objections and Responses To Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests For Production re # 97 Notice of Service, by Eaton Corporation. Related document: # 97 Notice of Service, filed by Paul Prosper, Purdy Brothers Trucking Co. Inc., Big Gain Inc., James Cordes, Joseph Williams, Meunier Enterprises LLC, Rodney E. Jaeger, Carleton Transport Service, Premier Produce Co. Inc., Ryan Avenarius.(Reid, Donald)
May 21, 2013 Filing 103 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Objections and Responses to Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Production to Each OEM re # 98 Notice of Service, by Daimler Trucks North America LLC, Freightliner LLC. Related document: # 98 Notice of Service, filed by Paul Prosper, Purdy Brothers Trucking Co. Inc., Big Gain Inc., James Cordes, Joseph Williams, Meunier Enterprises LLC, Rodney E. Jaeger, Carleton Transport Service, Premier Produce Co. Inc., Ryan Avenarius.(Sensing, John)
May 20, 2013 Filing 102 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Navistar International Corporation and Navistar, Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Indirect Purchases Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Production to Each OEM by Navistar, Inc..(Farnan, Kelly)
May 15, 2013 Filing 101 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Responses to Defendants' First Set of Requests for the Production of Documents re # 99 Notice of Service by Ryan Avenarius, Big Gain Inc., Carleton Transport Service, James Cordes, Rodney E. Jaeger, Meunier Enterprises LLC, Premier Produce Co. Inc., Paul Prosper, Purdy Brothers Trucking Co. Inc., Joseph Williams. Related document: # 99 Notice of Service filed by Eaton Corporation.(Driscoll, Thomas)
April 30, 2013 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Meaghan Thomas-Kennedy for Paccar Inc. added for electronic noticing. (dmp, )
April 24, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re # 100 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Meaghan Thomas-Kennedy filed by Paccar Inc., Peterbilt Motors Company, Kenworth Truck Co.. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 4/24/2013. (fms)
April 23, 2013 Filing 100 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Meaghan Thomas-Kennedy - filed by Kenworth Truck Co., Paccar Inc., Peterbilt Motors Company. (DiGiovanni, Francis)
April 15, 2013 Filing 99 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' First Set Of Requests For The Production Of Documents Directed To Plaintiffs by Eaton Corporation.(Reid, Donald)
April 15, 2013 Filing 98 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs First Set of Requests for Production to Each OEM by Ryan Avenarius, Big Gain Inc., Carleton Transport Service, James Cordes, Rodney E. Jaeger, Meunier Enterprises LLC, Premier Produce Co. Inc., Paul Prosper, Purdy Brothers Trucking Co. Inc., Joseph Williams.(Driscoll, Thomas)
April 15, 2013 Filing 97 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs First Set of Requests for Production to Eaton by Ryan Avenarius, Big Gain Inc., Carleton Transport Service, James Cordes, Rodney E. Jaeger, Meunier Enterprises LLC, Premier Produce Co. Inc., Paul Prosper, Purdy Brothers Trucking Co. Inc., Joseph Williams.(Driscoll, Thomas)
April 9, 2013 Pro Hac Vice Attorney David E. Sharp for Ryan Avenarius added for electronic noticing. (dmp, )
April 5, 2013 Filing 96 NOTICE of Change of Address by Thomas Francis Driscoll, III (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Driscoll, Thomas)
April 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER Setting Teleconference: A Telephone Conference is set for 4/29/2013 at 11:00 AM before Judge Christopher J. Burke to discuss ADR. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 4/5/2013. (dlk)
March 27, 2013 Filing 94 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosure Statement of Defendant PACCAR, Inc Pursuant to Rule 26(a)(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by Kenworth Truck Co., Paccar Inc., Peterbilt Motors Company.(DiGiovanni, Francis)
March 27, 2013 Filing 93 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(1) of Defendants Navistar International Corporation and Navistar, Inc., f/k/a International Truck and Engine Corporation by International Truck and Engine Corporation, Navistar International Corporation.(Farnan, Kelly)
March 27, 2013 Filing 92 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Daimler Trucks North America LLC's Initial Disclosures re # 88 Scheduling Order,,, by Daimler Trucks North America LLC, Freightliner LLC. Related document: # 88 Scheduling Order,,,.(Sensing, John)
March 27, 2013 Filing 91 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Eaton Corporation's Initial Disclosure Statement Pursuant To Rule 26(a)(1) Of The Federal Rules Of Civil Procedure by Eaton Corporation.(Reid, Donald)
March 27, 2013 Filing 90 NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(1) of Defendants Volvo Trucks North America and Mack Trucks, Inc. by Mack Trucks Inc., Volvo Trucks North America Inc. (Grant, M.)
March 27, 2013 Filing 89 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Initial Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Federal Rule Civ.P. 26(a)(1) by Ryan Avenarius, Big Gain Inc., Carleton Transport Service, James Cordes, Rodney E. Jaeger, Meunier Enterprises LLC, Premier Produce Co. Inc., Paul Prosper, Purdy Brothers Trucking Co. Inc., Joseph Williams.(Driscoll, Thomas)
March 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 88 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case referred to the Magistrate Judge for the purpose of exploring ADR. Discovery due by 11/24/2014. A Discovery Conference is set for 6/25/2013 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson. A 2nd Discovery Conference is set for 10/22/2013 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson. An Oral Argument on the motions for class certification is set for 9/5/2014 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson. A Telephonic Status Conference is set for 11/6/2014 at 04:30 PM before Judge Sue L. Robinson Dispositive Motions due by 11/24/2014. An Oral Argument on the motions for summary judgment is set for 3/27/2015 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson. A Final Pretrial Conference is set for 5/14/2015 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson. A Jury Trial is set for 6/1/2015 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 3/13/2013. (nmfn)
March 13, 2013 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sue L. Robinson - Scheduling Conference held on 3/13/2013. (Court Reporter not present.) (nmfn)
March 13, 2013 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Christopher J. Burke for Mediation. (dlk)
March 12, 2013 Filing 87 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David E. Sharp - filed by Ryan Avenarius, Big Gain Inc., Carleton Transport Service, James Cordes, Rodney E. Jaeger, Meunier Enterprises LLC, Premier Produce Co. Inc., Paul Prosper, Purdy Brothers Trucking Co. Inc., Joseph Williams. (Driscoll, Thomas)
March 12, 2013 Filing 86 PROPOSED ORDER "PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER" by Ryan Avenarius, Big Gain Inc., Carleton Transport Service, James Cordes, Rodney E. Jaeger, Meunier Enterprises LLC, Premier Produce Co. Inc., Paul Prosper, Purdy Brothers Trucking Co. Inc., Joseph Williams. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Driscoll, Thomas)
March 12, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re # 87 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David E. Sharp filed by Paul Prosper, Purdy Brothers Trucking Co. Inc., Big Gain Inc., James Cordes, Joseph Williams, Meunier Enterprises LLC, Rodney E. Jaeger, Carleton Transport Service, Premier Produce Co. Inc., Ryan Avenarius. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 3/12/2013. (fms)
March 11, 2013 Filing 85 Joint PROPOSED ORDER Stipulated Coordinated Confidentiality Agreement and [Proposed] Protective Order by Daimler Trucks North America LLC, Eaton Corporation, Freightliner LLC, International Truck and Engine Corporation, Kenworth Truck Co., Mack Trucks Inc., Navistar International Corporation, Paccar Inc., Peterbilt Motors Company, Volvo Trucks North America Inc.. (DiGiovanni, Francis)
March 11, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (111 in 1:10-cv-00260-SLR) STIPULATED COORDINATED CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT AND [PROPOSED] PROTECTIVE ORDER, filed by Kenworth Truck Company, Peterbilt Motors Company, International Truck and Engine Corporation, Eaton Corporation, Volvo Trucks North America, Freightliner LLC, Daimler Trucks North America LLC, Navistar International Corporation, Paccar Inc., Mack Trucks Inc., (85 in 1:11-cv-00009-SLR) STIPULATED COORDINATED CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT AND [PROPOSED] PROTECTIVE ORDER, filed by Peterbilt Motors Company, International Truck and Engine Corporation, Eaton Corporation, Kenworth Truck Co., Freightliner LLC, Navistar International Corporation, Daimler Trucks North America LLC, Paccar Inc., Mack Trucks Inc., Volvo Trucks North America Inc.. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 3/11/2013. Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00260-SLR, 1:11-cv-00009-SLR(fms)
March 7, 2013 Filing 84 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Gregory B. Linkh - filed by Ryan Avenarius, Big Gain Inc., Carleton Transport Service, James Cordes, Rodney E. Jaeger, Meunier Enterprises LLC, Premier Produce Co. Inc., Paul Prosper, Purdy Brothers Trucking Co. Inc., Joseph Williams. (Driscoll, Thomas)
March 7, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re # 84 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Gregory B. Linkh filed by Paul Prosper, Purdy Brothers Trucking Co. Inc., Big Gain Inc., James Cordes, Joseph Williams, Meunier Enterprises LLC, Rodney E. Jaeger, Carleton Transport Service, Premier Produce Co. Inc., Ryan Avenarius. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 3/7/2013. (fms)
March 7, 2013 Pro Hac Vice Attorney John Robert Robertson,Corey W. Roush,Justin W. Bernick,Benjamin F. Holt,Meghan C. Edwards-Ford for Daimler Trucks North America LLC added for electronic noticing. Associated Cases: 1:11-cv-00009-SLR, 1:10-cv-00260-SLR(dmp, )
February 26, 2013 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Jennifer W. Cowen for Navistar International Corporation added for electronic noticing. (dmp, )
February 22, 2013 Filing 83 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jennifer Cowen - filed by International Truck and Engine Corporation, Navistar International Corporation. (Farnan, Kelly)
February 22, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re # 83 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jennifer Cowen filed by Navistar International Corporation, International Truck and Engine Corporation. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 2/22/2013. (fms)
February 21, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re # 82 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney J. Robert Robertson, Corey W. Roush, Benjamin F. Holt, Justin W. Bernick, and Meghan C. Edwards-Ford filed by Daimler Trucks North America LLC. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 2/21/2013. (fms)
February 20, 2013 Filing 82 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney J. Robert Robertson, Corey W. Roush, Benjamin F. Holt, Justin W. Bernick, and Meghan C. Edwards-Ford - filed by Daimler Trucks North America LLC. (Horwitz, Richard)
February 20, 2013 Filing 81 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel to Withdraw All Attorneys from the law firm Bingham McCutchen LLP and to Substitute with J. Robert Robertson, Corey W. Roush, Benjamin F. Holt, Justin W. Bernick, and Meghan C. Edwards-Ford of the law firm Hogan Lovells US LLP by Daimler Trucks North America LLC (Horwitz, Richard)
February 19, 2013 Filing 80 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Richard R. Cook by Kenworth Truck Co., Paccar Inc., Peterbilt Motors Company (DiGiovanni, Francis)
February 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 79 Order Setting Telephonic Scheduling Conference: A Scheduling Conference is set for 3/13/2013 at 09:00 AM before Judge Sue L. Robinson. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 2/5/2013. (nmfn)
January 29, 2013 Filing 78 ANSWER to Amended Complaint ANSWER to # 73 Amended Complaint, by Kenworth Truck Co., Paccar Inc., Peterbilt Motors Company.(DiGiovanni, Francis)
January 29, 2013 Filing 77 ANSWER to Amended Complaint ANSWER to # 73 Amended Complaint, with JURY DEMAND by Eaton Corporation.(Reid, Donald)
January 29, 2013 Filing 76 ANSWER to Amended Complaint ANSWER to # 73 Amended Complaint, by Daimler Trucks North America LLC.(Sensing, John)
January 29, 2013 Filing 75 ANSWER to Amended Complaint ANSWER to # 73 Amended Complaint, by Mack Trucks Inc., Volvo Trucks North America Inc..(Grant, M.)
January 29, 2013 Filing 74 ANSWER to Amended Complaint ANSWER to # 73 Amended Complaint, ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF DEFENDANTS NAVISTAR INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION AND NAVISTAR, INC., F/K/A INTERNATIONAL TRUCK AND ENGINE CORPORATION by International Truck and Engine Corporation, Navistar International Corporation.(Farnan, Kelly)
January 15, 2013 Filing 73 Third AMENDED COMPLAINT "Third Amended Class Action Complaint" against All Defendants - filed by Meunier Enterprises LLC, Paul Prosper, James Cordes, Ryan Avenarius, Carleton Transport Service, Joseph Williams, Rodney E. Jaeger, Big Gain Inc., Purdy Brothers Trucking Co. Inc., Premier Produce Co. Inc..(Driscoll, Thomas)
January 15, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re # 71 MOTION to Amend/Correct # 36 Proposed Pretrial Order "Motion to Modify the Court's Pretrial Order No. 1 Appointing Interim Co-Lead Counsel" filed by Paul Prosper, Purdy Brothers Trucking Co. Inc., Big Gain Inc., James Cordes, Joseph Williams, Meunier Enterprises LLC, Rodney E. Jaeger, Carleton Transport Service, Premier Produce Co. Inc., Ryan Avenarius. Pretrial Order No. 1 is modified at paragraph 8 (See D.I. # 71 , part 2 - text of proposed pretrial order no. 2). Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 1/15/2013. (fms) Modified on 1/15/2013 (fms).
January 15, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re # 72 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Amend Second Amended Complaint to January 15, 2013 filed by Paul Prosper, Purdy Brothers Trucking Co. Inc., Big Gain Inc., James Cordes, Joseph Williams, Meunier Enterprises LLC, Rodney E. Jaeger, Carleton Transport Service, Premier Produce Co. Inc., Ryan Avenarius. See stipulation for further details. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 1/15/2013. (fms)
January 14, 2013 Filing 72 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Amend Second Amended Complaint to January 15, 2013 - filed by Ryan Avenarius, Big Gain Inc., Carleton Transport Service, James Cordes, Rodney E. Jaeger, Meunier Enterprises LLC, Premier Produce Co. Inc., Paul Prosper, Purdy Brothers Trucking Co. Inc., Joseph Williams. (Driscoll, Thomas)
January 14, 2013 Filing 71 MOTION to Amend/Correct # 36 Proposed Pretrial Order "Motion to Modify the Court's Pretrial Order No. 1 Appointing Interim Co-Lead Counsel" - filed by Ryan Avenarius, Big Gain Inc., Carleton Transport Service, James Cordes, Rodney E. Jaeger, Meunier Enterprises LLC, Premier Produce Co. Inc., Paul Prosper, Purdy Brothers Trucking Co. Inc., Joseph Williams. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Pretrial Order No. 2 Modifying the Court's Order Appointing Interim Co-Lead Counsel)(Driscoll, Thomas)
January 7, 2013 Filing 70 NOTICE of Firm Name Change by Kenworth Truck Co., Paccar Inc., Peterbilt Motors Company (DiGiovanni, Francis)
December 5, 2012 Filing 69 NOTICE of Appearance by John Anderson Sensing on behalf of Daimler Trucks North America LLC, Freightliner LLC (Sensing, John)
December 5, 2012 CORRECTING ENTRY: The notice of appearance has been deleted per request of filer. A corrected version will be filed shortly. (nmfn)
November 30, 2012 Filing 68 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT "Second Amended Class Action Complaint" against All Defendants - filed by Ryan Avenarius, Rodney E. Jaeger, Premier Produce Co., Inc., Meunier Enterprises LLC, Paul Prosper, James Cordes on behalf of Cordes, Inc., Purdy Brothers Trucking Co., Inc., Big Gain, Inc., Carleton Transport Service, Joseph Williams.(Driscoll, Thomas)
November 20, 2012 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re # 67 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Marvin Frank filed by Premier Produce Co., Inc., James Cordes, Ryan Avenarius, Rodney E. Jaeger. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 11/20/2012. (fms)
November 19, 2012 Filing 67 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Marvin Frank - filed by Ryan Avenarius, James Cordes, Rodney E. Jaeger, Premier Produce Co., Inc.. (Driscoll, Thomas)
November 15, 2012 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re # 66 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to File an Amended Complaint and Setting Deadline for Defendants' Response to November 30, 2012 (amended complaint)/January 14, 2013 (response to amended complaint) filed by Premier Produce Co., Inc., James Cordes, Ryan Avenarius, Rodney E. Jaeger.Setting Deadlines: ( Amended Pleadings due by 11/30/2012). Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 11/15/2012. (fms)
November 14, 2012 Filing 66 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to File an Amended Complaint and Setting Deadline for Defendants' Response to November 30, 2012 (amended complaint)/January 14, 2013 (response to amended complaint) - filed by Ryan Avenarius, James Cordes, Rodney E. Jaeger, Premier Produce Co., Inc.. (Driscoll, Thomas)
November 13, 2012 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Brian Murray for Ryan Avenarius added for electronic noticing. (dmp, )
November 2, 2012 Filing 65 NOTICE of Appearance by M. Curt Lambert on behalf of Kenworth Truck Co., Paccar Inc., Peterbilt Motors Company (Lambert, M.)
October 18, 2012 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re # 63 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Brian Murray filed by Premier Produce Co., Inc., James Cordes, Ryan Avenarius, Rodney E. Jaeger. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 10/18/2012. (fms)
October 17, 2012 Filing 64 NOTICE of Change of Address by Thomas Francis Driscoll, III (Driscoll, Thomas)
October 17, 2012 Filing 63 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Brian Murray - filed by Ryan Avenarius, James Cordes, Rodney E. Jaeger, Premier Produce Co., Inc.. (Driscoll, Thomas)
October 17, 2012 Filing 62 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Kevin G. Collins as Counsel for Ryan Avenarius, Rodney E. Jaeger, James Cordes and Premier Produce Co., Inc. by Ryan Avenarius, James Cordes, Rodney E. Jaeger, Premier Produce Co., Inc. (Driscoll, Thomas)
October 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting in part and denying in part # 46 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6), granting in part and denying in part # 48 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Defendant Eaton Corporation's Motion To Dismiss The Amended Class Action Complaint . ORDER, plaintiffs are granted leave to amend with respect to the consumer protection and unjust enrichment allegations, on or before November 16, 2012. Set Deadlines (Amended Pleadings due by 11/16/2012.). Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 10/16/2012. (nmfn)
October 16, 2012 Filing 60 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 10/16/2012. (nmfn)
September 26, 2012 Filing 59 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel of Dana K. Severance by Kenworth Truck Co., Paccar Inc., Peterbilt Motors Company (DiGiovanni, Francis)
September 14, 2011 Filing 58 NOTICE of WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL (W. HARDING DRANE, JR.) by Daimler Trucks North America LLC, Freightliner LLC (Drane, W.)
June 7, 2011 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Jeremy Heep for Mack Trucks Inc. added for electronic noticing. (nms)
June 7, 2011 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Daniel J. Boland for Mack Trucks Inc. added for electronic noticing. (nms)
June 2, 2011 CORRECTING ENTRY: Per request of counsel, D.I. 56 has been deleted and replaced with a brief containing a Table of Authorities. (fms)
June 1, 2011 Filing 57 REQUEST for Oral Argument by Ryan Avenarius, James Cordes, Rodney E. Jaeger, Premier Produce Co., Inc. re # 46 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6), # 48 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Defendant Eaton Corporation's Motion To Dismiss The Amended Class Action Complaint . (Collins, Kevin)
May 27, 2011 Filing 56 REPLY BRIEF re # 48 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Defendant Eaton Corporation's Motion To Dismiss The Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Eaton Corporation. (Reid, Donald) (Main Document 56 replaced on 6/2/2011) (fms).
May 27, 2011 Filing 55 REPLY BRIEF re # 46 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by Daimler Trucks North America LLC, Freightliner LLC, International Truck and Engine Corporation, Kenworth Truck Co., Mack Trucks Inc., Navistar International Corporation, Paccar Inc., Peterbilt Motors Company, Volvo Trucks North America Inc.. (Drane, W.)
May 6, 2011 Filing 54 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re # 46 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6), # 48 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Defendant Eaton Corporation's Motion To Dismiss The Amended Class Action Complaint // Plaintiffs' Omnibus Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant Eaton Corporation's and The Original Equipment Manufacturer Defendants' Motions to Dismiss filed by Ryan Avenarius, James Cordes, Rodney E. Jaeger, Premier Produce Co., Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 5/16/2011. (Collins, Kevin)
April 14, 2011 Pro Hac Vice Attorneys Joseph A. Ostoyich, Erik T. Koons, and William C. Lavery for Eaton Corporation added for electronic noticing. (nms)
April 14, 2011 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Leslie S. Garthwaite for International Truck and Engine Corporation and Navistar International Corporation added for electronic noticing. (nms)
April 6, 2011 Pro Hac Vice Attorneys Barbara C. Frankland, Joseph R. Gunderson, and Rex A. Sharp for Ryan Avenarius and Rodney E. Jaeger added for electronic noticing. (nms)
April 5, 2011 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re # 53 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Leslie S. Garthwaite filed by Navistar International Corporation, International Truck and Engine Corporation. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 4/5/11. (fms)
April 1, 2011 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re # 51 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Joseph R. Gunderson filed by Premier Produce Co., Inc., James Cordes, Ryan Avenarius, Rodney E. Jaeger. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 4/1/11. (fms)
April 1, 2011 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re # 50 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Joseph A. Ostoyich, Erik T. Koons and William C. Lavery filed by Eaton Corporation. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 4/1/11. (fms)
March 30, 2011 Filing 53 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Leslie S. Garthwaite - filed by International Truck and Engine Corporation, Navistar International Corporation. (Farnan, Kelly)
March 30, 2011 Filing 52 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Kenworth Truck Co., Paccar Inc., Peterbilt Motors Company. (DiGiovanni, Francis)
March 30, 2011 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re # 36 Proposed Pretrial Order filed by Premier Produce Co., Inc., James Cordes, Ryan Avenarius, Rodney E. Jaeger. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 3/30/2011. (nmf)
March 30, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sue L. Robinson - Telephone Conference held on 3/30/2011. (Court Reporter V. Gunning.) (nmf)
March 29, 2011 Filing 51 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Joseph R. Gunderson - filed by Ryan Avenarius, James Cordes, Rodney E. Jaeger, Premier Produce Co., Inc.. (Collins, Kevin)
March 29, 2011 Filing 50 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Joseph A. Ostoyich, Erik T. Koons and William C. Lavery - filed by Eaton Corporation. (Reid, Donald)
March 28, 2011 CORRECTING ENTRY: The docket text of D.I. Nos. 46 and 47 have been corrected to reflect all of the defts the motion and opening brief are filed by. (fms)
March 25, 2011 Filing 49 OPENING BRIEF in Support re # 48 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Defendant Eaton Corporation's Motion To Dismiss The Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Eaton Corporation.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 4/11/2011. (Reid, Donald)
March 25, 2011 Filing 48 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Defendant Eaton Corporation's Motion To Dismiss The Amended Class Action Complaint - filed by Eaton Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reid, Donald)
March 25, 2011 Filing 47 OPENING BRIEF in Support re # 46 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) DEFENDANTS ORIGINAL EQUIPMENT MANUFACTURERS' OPENING BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Daimler Trucks North America LLC, Freightliner LLC, Paccar Inc., Peterbilt Motors Company, Volvo Trucks North America, Inc., Kenworth Truck Co., Mack Trucks Inc., Navistar International Corporation, International Truck and Engine Corporation ..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 4/11/2011. (Drane, W.) Modified on 3/28/2011 (fms).
March 25, 2011 Filing 46 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) - filed by Daimler Trucks North America LLC, Freightliner LLC, Paccar Inc., Peterbilt Motors Company, Volvo Trucks North America, Inc., Kenworth Truck Co., Mack Trucks Inc., Navistar International Corporation, International Truck and Engine Corporation . (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Drane, W.) Modified on 3/28/2011 (fms).
March 25, 2011 Filing 45 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Miriam L. Lieberman as co-counsel. Reason for request: withdrawal of appearance. (Farnan, Kelly)
March 25, 2011 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald E. Reid on behalf of Eaton Corporation (Reid, Donald)
March 23, 2011 Filing 43 Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Kevin Grant Collins, Esq. regarding Status Conference Dial-in Information - re # 42 Order Setting Teleconference. (Collins, Kevin)
March 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Order Setting Teleconference: Telephone Conference set for 3/30/2011 09:00 AM before Judge Sue L. Robinson. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 3/22/2011. (nmf)
March 18, 2011 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Daniel S. Savrin for Daimler Trucks North America LLC added for electronic noticing. (dmp, )
March 18, 2011 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re # 39 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jeremy Heep and Daniel J. Boland filed by Mack Trucks Inc., Volvo Trucks North America Inc. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 3/18/11. (fms)
March 15, 2011 Filing 41 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Mack Trucks Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Aktiebolaget Volvo, Corporate Parent VNA Holding, Inc. for Mack Trucks Inc... (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Grant, M.)
March 15, 2011 Filing 40 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Volvo Trucks North America Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Aktiebolaget Volvo, Corporate Parent Mack Trucks, Inc., Corporate Parent VNA Holding, Inc. for Volvo Trucks North America Inc... (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Grant, M.)
March 15, 2011 Filing 39 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jeremy Heep and Daniel J. Boland - filed by Mack Trucks Inc., Volvo Trucks North America Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certification by Jeremy Heep to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice, # 2 Certification of Daniel Boland to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice, # 3 Proposed Order Admitting Jeremy Heep and Daniel Boland Pro Hac Vice, # 4 Certificate of Service)(Grant, M.)
March 15, 2011 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by M. Duncan Grant on behalf of Mack Trucks Inc., Volvo Trucks North America Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Grant, M.)
March 15, 2011 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Daniel L. Goldberg,Gregory F. Wells for Daimler Trucks North America LLC added for electronic noticing. (dmp, )
March 9, 2011 Pro Hac Vice Attorneys James H. Mutchnik, Andrew Paul Bautista, Daniel E. Laytin, Miriam L. Lieberman for International Truck and Engine Corporation and for Navistar International Corporation added for electronic noticing. (nms)
March 4, 2011 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Benjamin D. Bianco for Ryan Avenarius added for electronic noticing. (dmp, )
February 23, 2011 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re # 37 Stipulation filed by Premier Produce Co., Inc., James Cordes, Ryan Avenarius, Rodney E. Jaeger, Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: All Defendants - answers due 3/25/2011. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 2/23/2011. (nmf)
February 22, 2011 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Lee Albert for Ryan Avenarius added for electronic noticing. (dmp, )
February 18, 2011 Pro Hac Vice Attorneys James C. Egan, Jr, Carrie M. Anderson, and Richard R. Cook for Kenworth Truck Co., Paccar Inc., and Peterbilt Motors Company added for electronic noticing. (nms)
February 15, 2011 Filing 37 Joint STIPULATION and Proposed Order for Enlargement of Time and Page Limitation re # 36 Proposed Pretrial Order, # 35 Letter by Ryan Avenarius, James Cordes, Rodney E. Jaeger, Premier Produce Co., Inc.. (Collins, Kevin)
February 15, 2011 Filing 36 Proposed Pretrial Order No. 1 by Ryan Avenarius, James Cordes, Rodney E. Jaeger, Premier Produce Co., Inc.. (Collins, Kevin)
February 15, 2011 Filing 35 Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Kevin Grant Collins, Esq. regarding Proposed Pretrial Order No. 1 and Joint Stipulation with Proposed Order for Enlargement of Time and Page Limits. (Collins, Kevin)
February 11, 2011 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re # 32 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Daniel L. Goldberg, Daniel S. Savrin and Gregory F. Wells. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 2/11/2011. (lid)
February 8, 2011 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re # 24 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney James C. Egan, Carrie M. Anderson, and Robin Cook. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 2/8/2011. (lid)
February 4, 2011 Filing 34 AMENDED COMPLAINT "Amended Class Action Complaint" against All Defendants - filed by Ryan Avenarius, Rodney E. Jaeger, James Cordes, Premier Produce Co., Inc..(Collins, Kevin)
February 4, 2011 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re # 30 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney James H. Mutchnik, Daniel E. Laytin, Andrew Paul Bautista and Miriam Lauren Lieberman, # 31 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Rex A. Sharp and Barbara C. Frankland. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 2/4/2011. (lid)
February 3, 2011 Filing 33 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Daimler Trucks North America LLC, Freightliner LLC. (Drane, W.)
February 3, 2011 Filing 32 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Daniel L. Goldberg, Daniel S. Savrin and Gregory F. Wells of Bingham McCutchen LLP - filed by Daimler Trucks North America LLC, Freightliner LLC. (Drane, W.)
February 1, 2011 Filing 31 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Rex A. Sharp and Barbara C. Frankland - filed by Ryan Avenarius, Rodney E. Jaeger. (Collins, Kevin)
January 31, 2011 Filing 30 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney James H. Mutchnik, Daniel E. Laytin, Andrew Paul Bautista and Miriam Lauren Lieberman - filed by International Truck and Engine Corporation, Navistar International Corporation. (Farnan, Kelly)
January 28, 2011 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re # 28 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Lee Albert and Benjamin D. Bianco. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 1/28/2011. (lid)
January 26, 2011 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly E. Farnan on behalf of International Truck and Engine Corporation, Navistar International Corporation (Farnan, Kelly)
January 24, 2011 Filing 28 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Lee Albert and Benjamin D. Bianco - filed by Ryan Avenarius, Rodney E. Jaeger. (Collins, Kevin)
January 24, 2011 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance of Joseph R. Gunderson, Rex A. Sharp and Barbara C. Frankland by Ryan Avenarius, Rodney E. Jaeger (Collins, Kevin)
January 24, 2011 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance of Lee Albert and Benjamin D. Bianco by Ryan Avenarius, Rodney E. Jaeger (Collins, Kevin)
January 24, 2011 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance of Ian Connor Bifferato, Matthew Denn, Thomas F. Driscoll III and Kevin G. Collins by Ryan Avenarius, Rodney E. Jaeger (Collins, Kevin)
January 24, 2011 Case Reassigned to Judge Sue L. Robinson (due to related case). Please include the initials of the Judge (SLR) after the case number on all documents filed. (bkb)
January 14, 2011 CORRECTING ENTRY: The main document in D.I. 24, Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice has been replaced with its corrected version. (asw)
January 13, 2011 Filing 24 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney James C. Egan, Carrie M. Anderson, and Robin Cook - filed by Kenworth Truck Co., Paccar Inc., Peterbilt Motors Company. (DiGiovanni, Francis) (asw).
January 12, 2011 Case Assigned to Judge Gregory M. Sleet. Please include the initials of the Judge (GMS) after the case number on all documents filed. (bkb)
January 7, 2011 Filing 23 NOTICE of RELATED ACTION (WALLACH V. EATON CORP., NO. 10-CV-260-SLR) by Daimler Trucks North America LLC, Eaton Corporation, Freightliner LLC, International Truck and Engine Corporation, Kenworth Truck Co., Mack Trucks Inc., Navistar International Corporation, Paccar Inc., Peterbilt Motors Company, Volvo Trucks North America Inc. (Drane, W.)
January 6, 2011 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Dana Kathryn Severance on behalf of Kenworth Truck Co., Paccar Inc., Peterbilt Motors Company (Severance, Dana)
January 6, 2011 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Francis DiGiovanni on behalf of Kenworth Truck Co., Paccar Inc., Peterbilt Motors Company (DiGiovanni, Francis)
January 5, 2011 Filing 20 Local Counsel Letter sent to Defendant's counsel. Notice of Compliance deadline set for 2/7/2011. (els)
January 5, 2011 Filing 19 Local Counsel Letter sent to Plaintiff's counsel. Notice of Compliance deadline set for 2/7/2011. (els)
January 5, 2011 Filing 18 Record of case transferred in from District of Kansas; Case Number in Other District: 2:10-cv-02539. Copy of Docket Sheet and original file
January 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting 15 Motion to Transfer. This action is transferred to the United States District Court for the District of Delaware pursuant to 28 USC 1404. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 1/4/2011. (alm)[Transferred from Kansas on 1/5/2011.] (els).
January 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting 15 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Response deadline 2/7/2011. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 1/3/2011. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (cm) [Transferred from Kansas on 1/5/2011.]
December 28, 2010 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Order Motion to Transfer and for Extension of Time , MOTION for extension of time ( Response deadline 1/11/2011) by Defendants Daimler Trucks North America LLC, Eaton Corporation, Freightliner LLC, International Truck and Engine Corporation, Kenworth Truck Co., Mack Trucks Inc, Navistar International Corporation, PACCAR Inc., Peterbilt Motors Company, Volvo Trucks North America, Inc.(Novian, Laurie) [Transferred from Kansas on 1/5/2011.]
December 28, 2010 Filing 14 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Ryan Avenarius, Rodney E. Jaeger upon Freightliner LLC served on 12/17/2010, answer due 1/7/2011 (Sharp, Rex) [Transferred from Kansas on 1/5/2011.]
December 17, 2010 Filing 13 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 1/3/2010 for Defendants Daimler Trucks North America LLC, Freightliner LLC, International Truck and Engine Corporation, Peterbilt Motors Company, Mack Trucks Inc, Navistar International Corporation, Volvo Trucks North America, Inc., PACCAR Inc., Eaton Corporation to answer or otherwise plead, and extending time to 1/4/2010 for Kenworth Truck Co. to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 12/17/2010. (adw) [Transferred from Kansas on 1/5/2011.]
December 16, 2010 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Freightliner LLC. Summons emailed to Attorney for service. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ta) [Transferred from Kansas on 1/5/2011.]
December 14, 2010 Filing 12 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Ryan Avenarius, Rodney E. Jaeger upon Kenworth Truck Co. served on 11/30/2010, answer due 12/21/2010 (Sharp, Rex) [Transferred from Kansas on 1/5/2011.]
December 14, 2010 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Ryan Avenarius, Rodney E. Jaeger upon Volvo Trucks North America, Inc. served on 11/29/2010, answer due 12/20/2010 (Sharp, Rex) [Transferred from Kansas on 1/5/2011.]
December 14, 2010 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Ryan Avenarius, Rodney E. Jaeger upon Peterbilt Motors Company served on 11/29/2010, answer due 12/20/2010 (Sharp, Rex) [Transferred from Kansas on 1/5/2011.]
December 14, 2010 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Ryan Avenarius, Rodney E. Jaeger upon PACCAR Inc. served on 11/29/2010, answer due 12/20/2010 (Sharp, Rex) [Transferred from Kansas on 1/5/2011.]
December 14, 2010 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Ryan Avenarius, Rodney E. Jaeger upon Navistar International Corporation served on 11/29/2010, answer due 12/20/2010 (Sharp, Rex) (Main Document 8 replaced on 12/14/2010) (ta). [Transferred from Kansas on 1/5/2011.]
December 14, 2010 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Ryan Avenarius, Rodney E. Jaeger upon Mack Trucks Inc served on 11/29/2010, answer due 12/20/2010 (Sharp, Rex) [Transferred from Kansas on 1/5/2011.]
December 14, 2010 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Ryan Avenarius, Rodney E. Jaeger upon International Truck and Engine Corporation served on 11/29/2010, answer due 12/20/2010 (Sharp, Rex) [Transferred from Kansas on 1/5/2011.]
December 14, 2010 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Ryan Avenarius and Rodney E. Jaeger upon Eaton Corporation served on 11/29/2010, answer due 12/20/2010 (Sharp, Rex) [Transferred from Kansas on 1/5/2011.]
December 14, 2010 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Ryan Avenarius and Rodney E. Jaeger upon Daimler Trucks North America LLC served on 11/29/2010, answer due 12/20/2010 (Sharp, Rex) [Transferred from Kansas on 1/5/2011.]
November 23, 2010 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Daimler Trucks North America LLC, Eaton Corporation, International Truck and Engine Corporation, Kenworth Truck Co., Mack Trucks Inc, Navistar International Corporation, PACCAR Inc., Peterbilt Motors Company, Volvo Trucks North America, Inc. Summons emailed to Attorney for service. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ta) [Transferred from Kansas on 1/5/2011.]
October 5, 2010 FILING FEE PAID: In the amount of $ 350, receipt number K4631024768. (kao) [Transferred from Kansas on 1/5/2011.]
October 4, 2010 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiffs Ryan Avenarius, Rodney E. Jaeger - trial to be held in Kansas City. (kao) [Transferred from Kansas on 1/5/2011.]
October 4, 2010 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re # 1 Complaint by Plaintiffs Ryan Avenarius, Rodney E. Jaeger. (kao) [Transferred from Kansas on 1/5/2011.] (els).
October 4, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (No Summons Issued) with trial location of Kansas City, Kansas, filed by Ryan Avenarius, Rodney E. Jaeger.(kao) [Transferred from Kansas on 1/5/2011.] (els).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: Class 8 Transmission Indirect Purchaser Antitrust Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Avenarius
Represented By: Lee Albert
Represented By: Ian Connor Bifferato
Represented By: Thomas Francis Driscoll, III
Represented By: Barbara C. Frankland
Represented By: Joseph R. Gunderson
Represented By: Jason Hartley
Represented By: Jason M. Lindner
Represented By: Brian Murray
Represented By: David E. Sharp
Represented By: Rex A. Sharp
Represented By: Kevin Grant Collins
Represented By: Benjamin D. Bianco
Represented By: Matthew Denn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Big Gain Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Francis Driscoll, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carleton Transport Service
Represented By: Thomas Francis Driscoll, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Cordes
Represented By: Ian Connor Bifferato
Represented By: Thomas Francis Driscoll, III
Represented By: Kevin Grant Collins
Represented By: Matthew Denn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney E. Jaeger
Represented By: Ian Connor Bifferato
Represented By: Thomas Francis Driscoll, III
Represented By: Barbara C. Frankland
Represented By: Joseph R. Gunderson
Represented By: Rex A. Sharp
Represented By: Kevin Grant Collins
Represented By: Matthew Denn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meunier Enterprises LLC
Represented By: Thomas Francis Driscoll, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Premier Produce Co. Inc.
Represented By: Ian Connor Bifferato
Represented By: Thomas Francis Driscoll, III
Represented By: Kevin Grant Collins
Represented By: Matthew Denn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Prosper
Represented By: Thomas Francis Driscoll, III
Represented By: Brian D Penny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Purdy Brothers Trucking Co. Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Francis Driscoll, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Williams
Represented By: Thomas Francis Driscoll, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daimler Trucks North America LLC
Represented By: Justin W. Bernick
Represented By: Meghan C. Edwards-Ford
Represented By: Benjamin F. Holt
Represented By: Richard L. Horwitz
Represented By: John Robert Robertson
Represented By: Corey W. Roush
Represented By: John Anderson Sensing
Represented By: W. Harding Drane, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel L. Goldberg
Represented By: Daniel S. Savrin
Represented By: Gregory F. Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eaton Corporation
Represented By: Erik T. Koons
Represented By: William C. Lavery
Represented By: Joseph A. Ostoyich
Represented By: Donald E. Reid
Represented By: Julie B. Rubenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freightliner LLC
Represented By: Richard L. Horwitz
Represented By: John Anderson Sensing
Represented By: W. Harding Drane, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Truck and Engine Corporation
Represented By: Andrew Paul Bautista
Represented By: Kelly E. Farnan
Represented By: Leslie S. Garthwaite
Represented By: Daniel E. Laytin
Represented By: James H. Mutchnik
Represented By: Miriam L. Lieberman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenworth Truck Co.
Represented By: Eric James Evain
Represented By: James D. Heisman
Represented By: Dana Kathryn Severance
Represented By: Richard R. Cook
Represented By: Carrie M. Anderson
Represented By: James C. Egan, Jr.
Represented By: Francis DiGiovanni
Represented By: M. Curt Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mack Trucks Inc.
Represented By: Daniel J. Boland
Represented By: M. Duncan Grant
Represented By: Jeremy Heep
Represented By: James Harry Stone Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navistar International Corporation
Represented By: Andrew Paul Bautista
Represented By: Kelly E. Farnan
Represented By: Leslie S. Garthwaite
Represented By: Daniel E. Laytin
Represented By: James H. Mutchnik
Represented By: Miriam L. Lieberman
Represented By: Brian Borchard
Represented By: Jennifer W. Cowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navistar, Inc.
Represented By: Kelly E. Farnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paccar Inc.
Represented By: Eric James Evain
Represented By: James D. Heisman
Represented By: Dana Kathryn Severance
Represented By: Richard R. Cook
Represented By: Carrie M. Anderson
Represented By: James C. Egan, Jr.
Represented By: Francis DiGiovanni
Represented By: M. Curt Lambert
Represented By: Thomas L. Boeder
Represented By: Cori G. Moore
Represented By: Catherine S. Simonsen
Represented By: Eric J. Weiss
Represented By: Meaghan Thomas-Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peterbilt Motors Company
Represented By: Eric James Evain
Represented By: James D. Heisman
Represented By: Dana Kathryn Severance
Represented By: Richard R. Cook
Represented By: Carrie M. Anderson
Represented By: James C. Egan, Jr.
Represented By: Francis DiGiovanni
Represented By: M. Curt Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Volvo Trucks North America Inc.
Represented By: M. Duncan Grant
Represented By: James Harry Stone Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?