Robocast Inc. v. Apple Inc.
Plaintiff: Robocast Inc.
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Case Number: 1:2011cv00235
Filed: March 21, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Legrome D. Davis
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 485 MEMORANDUM ORDER Denying 466 MOTION for Reconsideration re 457 Memorandum Opinion, filed by Robocast Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/11/2014. (nms)
April 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 457 MEMORANDUM OPINION re Motions for Summary Judgment (see D.I. 292 , 297 , and 302 ). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/22/2014. (nms)
January 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 440 MEMORANDUM ORDER Granting 341 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Robert J. Sherwood and Creighton G. Hoffman. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/28/2014. (nms)
January 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 428 MEMORANDUM ORDER Denying 337 MOTION to Exclude Portions Of The Testimony Of Defendants Damages Expert, Raymond Sims. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/14/2014. (nms)
October 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 335 ORDER ADOPTING 266 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of the Special Master. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/28/2013. (nms)
February 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/24/2012. (ksr, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robocast Inc. v. Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robocast Inc.
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Represented By: David Ellis Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?