Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd. et al v. Apple Inc. Featured Case
Plaintiff: Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America LLC
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Case Number: 1:2011cv00573
Filed: June 29, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: XX Outside US
Presiding Judge: Leonard P. Stark
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2011 Case Stayed. (rpg)
August 5, 2011 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 7 MOTION to Stay Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1659(a) - Unopposed filed by Apple Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/5/2011. (rpg)
August 4, 2011 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant Apple Inc. to answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement to August 22, 2011 filed by Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Apple Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/4/2011. (rpg)
August 4, 2011 CORRECTING ENTRY: "SO ORDERED" entry re 7 deleted. Case is not stayed at this time insofar as motion is still pending before Court. (rpg)
August 2, 2011 Filing 8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant Apple Inc. to answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement to August 22, 2011 - filed by Apple Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Herrmann, Richard)
August 2, 2011 Filing 7 MOTION to Stay Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1659(a) - Unopposed - filed by Apple Inc.. (Herrmann, Richard)
July 20, 2011 Remark: notice of electronic filing re 6 Amended Complaint re-generated to all counsel of record. (rpg)
July 20, 2011 CORRECTING ENTRY: Exhibits 1-5 added to d.i. 6 Amended Complaint per counsel's telephone request on 7/20/2011. (rpg)
July 20, 2011 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Apple Inc.- filed by Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America LLC.(Keller, Karen) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/20/2011: # 1 Exhibits 1-5) (rpg).
July 6, 2011 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Apple Inc. on June 30, 2011, filed by Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-D)(Kraman, Pilar)
July 6, 2011 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
June 30, 2011 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Kraman, Pilar)
June 30, 2011 CORRECTING ENTRY: The summons issued entry entered on 6/30/2011, has been amended to reflect that the registered agent has also been served. (nms)
June 30, 2011 Summons Issued as to Apple Inc. on 6/30/2011; Summons Issued as to Apple Inc., c/o CT Corporation System, Registered Agent. Requesting party should contact the Help Desk at 302-573-6170 to arrange for pick-up or mailing of the summons. (nms) Modified on 6/30/2011 (nms).
June 29, 2011 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,706,348; 7,486,644; 6,771,980; 6,879,843; 7,450,114. (nms)
June 29, 2011 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nms)
June 29, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Apple Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0311-910227) - filed by Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-5, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(nms)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd. et al v. Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd.
Represented By: Karen Elizabeth Keller
Represented By: Pilar Gabrielle Kraman
Represented By: Adam Wyatt Poff
Represented By: John W. Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samsung Telecommunications America LLC
Represented By: Karen Elizabeth Keller
Represented By: Pilar Gabrielle Kraman
Represented By: Adam Wyatt Poff
Represented By: John W. Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?