HTC Corporation v. Apple Inc. Featured Case

Taiwanese mobile phone maker HTC filed a patent infringement lawsuit against Apple, alleging that the Silicon Valley tech giant violated two of its patents, and wants a court to block and enjoin imports of all Apple devices into the U.S. that plaintiff claims violate its patents.

This lawsuit is another in a series of patent disputes between the two technology companies.

Plaintiff: HTC Corporation
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Case Number: 1:2011cv00715
Filed: August 15, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: XX Outside US
Presiding Judge: Gregory M. Sleet
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2011 Filing 11 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel (John W. Shaw and Karen E. Keller) by HTC Corporation (Pascale, Karen)
September 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SO ORDERED, re 9 Stipulation filed by Apple Inc., HTC Corporation. Signed by Chief Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 9/21/2011. (asw)
September 21, 2011 Filing 9 STIPULATION to Stay Delaware Action until ITC action has been resolved by Apple Inc., HTC Corporation. (Herrmann, Richard)
September 6, 2011 Filing 8 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,765,414; 7,672,219; 7,417,944; 6,473,006; 6,708,214; 6,868,283; 7,289,772 ; 7,020,849. (Pascale, Karen)
September 6, 2011 Filing 7 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Apple Inc.- filed by HTC Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - B, # 2 Exhibit C - E, # 3 Exhibit F - H)(Pascale, Karen)
September 6, 2011 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant Apple Inc. to answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint for Patent Infringement to September 20, 2011 filed by Apple Inc., HTC Corporation, Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Apple Inc. answer due 9/20/2011. Ordered by Chief Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 9/6/2011. (asw)
September 6, 2011 Filing 6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant Apple Inc. to answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint for Patent Infringement to September 20, 2011 - filed by Apple Inc., HTC Corporation. (Herrmann, Richard)
August 24, 2011 Case Assigned to Judge Gregory M. Sleet. Please include the initials of the Judge (GMS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
August 18, 2011 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Defendant Apple Inc. on August 16, 2011, filed by HTC Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-D)(Keller, Karen)
August 15, 2011 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by HTC Corporation. (els)
August 15, 2011 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,765,414; 7,672,219; 7,417,944;. (els)
August 15, 2011 Summons Issued as to Apple Inc. on 8/16/2011. Requesting party should contact the Help Desk at 302-573-6170 to arrange for pick-up or mailing of the summons. (els)
August 15, 2011 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction (els)
August 15, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Apple Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0311-932139.) - filed by HTC Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(els)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HTC Corporation v. Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HTC Corporation
Represented By: Karen Elizabeth Keller
Represented By: Karen L. Pascale
Represented By: John W. Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Represented By: Richard K. Herrmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?