Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. v. Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., Mylan Inc., Matrix Laboratories Limited and Matrix Laboratories Inc.
Case Number: 1:2011cv00717
Filed: August 16, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Joseph E. Irenas
Presiding Judge: Karen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 326 Redacted version of 4/8/14 OPINION re: 308 , 325 . Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 4/8/14. (gvw)
January 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 226 OPINION (re bench trial). Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 1/28/2014. (bkb)
August 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 167 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION OPINION. Signed by Judge Joseph E. Irenas on 8/7/2013. (bkb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. v. Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Julia Heaney
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: David Ellis Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Inc.
Represented By: David Ellis Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matrix Laboratories Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matrix Laboratories Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?