Cox Communications Inc. et al v. Sprint Communications Company LP et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Cox Communications Inc., CoxCom LLC, Cox Arkansas Telcom LLC, Cox Communications Arizona LLC, Cox Arizona Telcom LLC, Cox California Telcom LLC, Cox Communications California LLC, Cox Colorado Telcom LLC, Cox Connecticut Telcom LLC, Cox District of Columbia Telcom LLC, Cox Florida Telcom LP, Cox Communications Georgia LLC, Cox Georgia Telcom LLC, Cox Iowa Telcom LLC, Cox Idaho Telcom LLC, Cox Communications Kansas LLC, Cox Kansas Telcom LLC, Cox Communications Gulf Coast LLC, Cox Communications Louisiana LLC, Cox Louisiana Telcom LLC, Cox Maryland Telcom LLC, Cox Missouri Telcom LLC, Cox Nebraska Telcom LLC, Cox Communications Omaha LLC, Cox Communications Las Vegas Inc., Cox Nevada Telcom LLC, Cox North Carolina Telcom LLC, Cox Ohio Telcom LLC, Cox Oklahoma Telcom LLC, Cox Rhode Island Telcom LLC, Cox Communications Hampton Roads LLC and Cox Virginia Telcom LLC
Defendant: Sprint Communication Company LP, Sprint Spectrum LP and Sprint Solutions Inc.
Case Number: 1:2012cv00487
Filed: April 16, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Sue L. Robinson
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2012 Filing 38 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cox Nebraska Telcom LLC, Cox Communications Omaha LLC, Cox Arkansas Telcom LLC, Cox Communications Inc., Cox Rhode Island Telcom LLC, Cox California Telcom LLC, Cox Ohio Telcom LLC, Cox Communications Louisiana LLC, Cox Connecticut Telcom LLC, Cox District of Columbia Telcom LLC, Cox Iowa Telcom LLC, Cox Maryland Telcom LLC, Cox Kansas Telcom LLC, Cox Communications Arizona LLC, Cox Florida Telcom LP, Cox Communications Hampton Roads LLC, Cox North Carolina Telcom LLC, Cox Colorado Telcom LLC, Cox Communications Kansas LLC, Cox Arizona Telcom LLC, Cox Oklahoma Telcom LLC, Cox Missouri Telcom LLC, Cox Virginia Telcom LLC, Cox Louisiana Telcom LLC, Cox Communications Gulf Coast LLC, CoxCom LLC, Cox Communications Georgia LLC, Cox Georgia Telcom LLC, Cox Communications Las Vegas Inc., Cox Communications California LLC, Cox Idaho Telcom LLC, Cox Nevada Telcom LLC. Sprint Solutions Inc. served on 4/18/2012, answer due 5/9/2012. (Phillips, John)
April 18, 2012 Filing 37 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cox Nebraska Telcom LLC, Cox Communications Omaha LLC, Cox Arkansas Telcom LLC, Cox Communications Inc., Cox Rhode Island Telcom LLC, Cox California Telcom LLC, Cox Ohio Telcom LLC, Cox Communications Louisiana LLC, Cox Connecticut Telcom LLC, Cox District of Columbia Telcom LLC, Cox Iowa Telcom LLC, Cox Maryland Telcom LLC, Cox Kansas Telcom LLC, Cox Communications Arizona LLC, Cox Florida Telcom LP, Cox Communications Hampton Roads LLC, Cox North Carolina Telcom LLC, Cox Colorado Telcom LLC, Cox Communications Kansas LLC, Cox Arizona Telcom LLC, Cox Oklahoma Telcom LLC, Cox Missouri Telcom LLC, Cox Virginia Telcom LLC, Cox Louisiana Telcom LLC, Cox Communications Gulf Coast LLC, CoxCom LLC, Cox Communications Georgia LLC, Cox Georgia Telcom LLC, Cox Communications Las Vegas Inc., Cox Communications California LLC, Cox Idaho Telcom LLC, Cox Nevada Telcom LLC. Sprint Spectrum LP served on 4/18/2012, answer due 5/9/2012. (Phillips, John)
April 18, 2012 Filing 36 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cox Nebraska Telcom LLC, Cox Communications Omaha LLC, Cox Arkansas Telcom LLC, Cox Communications Inc., Cox Rhode Island Telcom LLC, Cox California Telcom LLC, Cox Ohio Telcom LLC, Cox Communications Louisiana LLC, Cox Connecticut Telcom LLC, Cox District of Columbia Telcom LLC, Cox Iowa Telcom LLC, Cox Maryland Telcom LLC, Cox Kansas Telcom LLC, Cox Communications Arizona LLC, Cox Florida Telcom LP, Cox Communications Hampton Roads LLC, Cox North Carolina Telcom LLC, Cox Colorado Telcom LLC, Cox Communications Kansas LLC, Cox Arizona Telcom LLC, Cox Oklahoma Telcom LLC, Cox Missouri Telcom LLC, Cox Virginia Telcom LLC, Cox Louisiana Telcom LLC, Cox Communications Gulf Coast LLC, CoxCom LLC, Cox Communications Georgia LLC, Cox Georgia Telcom LLC, Cox Communications Las Vegas Inc., Cox Communications California LLC, Cox Idaho Telcom LLC, Cox Nevada Telcom LLC. Sprint Communication Company LP served on 4/18/2012, answer due 5/9/2012. (Phillips, John)
April 17, 2012 Filing 35 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Cox Georgia Telcom LLC identifying Corporate Parent Cox Communications Georgia LLC, Other Affiliate Cox Communications Inc., Other Affiliate Cox Enterprises Inc. for Cox Georgia Telcom LLC. (lih)
April 17, 2012 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Sprint Communication Company LP on 4/17/2012; Sprint Solutions Inc. on 4/17/2012; Sprint Spectrum LP on 4/17/2012. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (lih)
April 16, 2012 Filing 34 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Cox Louisiana Telcom LLC identifying Corporate Parent Cox Communications Louisiana LLC, Other Affiliate Cox Communications Inc., Other Affiliate Cox Enterprises Inc., Other Affiliate CoxCom LLC, Other Affiliate Cox Communications LLC Management Inc. for Cox Louisiana Telcom LLC. (lih)
April 16, 2012 Filing 33 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Cox Communications Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Cox Enterprises Inc., Other Affiliate Cox DNS Inc. for Cox Communications Inc.. (lih)
April 16, 2012 Filing 32 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Cox Virginia Telcom LLC identifying Corporate Parent Cox Communications Hampton Roads LLC, Other Affiliate Cox Communications Inc., Other Affiliate Cox Enterprises Inc., Other Affiliate CoxCom LLC for Cox Virginia Telcom LLC. (lih)
April 16, 2012 Filing 31 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Cox Communications Hampton Roads LLC identifying Corporate Parent CoxCom LLC, Other Affiliate Cox Communications Inc., Other Affiliate Cox Enterprises Inc. for Cox Communications Hampton Roads LLC. (lih)
April 16, 2012 Filing 30 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Cox Rhode Island Telcom LLC identifying Corporate Parent CoxCom LLC, Other Affiliate Cox Communications Inc., Other Affiliate Cox Enterprises Inc. for Cox Rhode Island Telcom LLC. (lih)
April 16, 2012 Filing 29 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Cox Oklahoma Telcom LLC identifying Corporate Parent CoxCom LLC, Other Affiliate Cox Communications Inc., Other Affiliate Cox Enterprises Inc. for Cox Oklahoma Telcom LLC. (lih)
April 16, 2012 Filing 28 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Cox Ohio Telcom LLC identifying Corporate Parent CoxCom LLC, Other Affiliate Cox Communications Inc., Other Affiliate Cox Enterprises Inc. for Cox Ohio Telcom LLC. (lih)
April 16, 2012 Filing 27 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Cox North Carolina Telcom LLC identifying Corporate Parent CoxCom LLC, Other Affiliate Cox Communications Inc., Other Affiliate Cox Enterprises Inc. for Cox North Carolina Telcom LLC. (lih)
April 16, 2012 Filing 26 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Cox Nevada Telcom LLC identifying Corporate Parent Cox Communications Inc., Other Affiliate Cox Enterprises Inc. for Cox Nevada Telcom LLC. (lih)
April 16, 2012 Filing 25 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Cox Communications Las Vegas Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Cox Communications Inc., Other Affiliate Cox Enterprises Inc. for Cox Communications Las Vegas Inc.. (lih)
April 16, 2012 Filing 24 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Cox Communications Omaha LLC identifying Corporate Parent CoxCom LLC, Other Affiliate Cox Communications Inc., Other Affiliate Cox Enterprises Inc. for Cox Communications Omaha LLC. (lih)
April 16, 2012 Filing 23 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Cox Nebraska Telcom LLC identifying Corporate Parent CoxCom LLC, Other Affiliate Cox Communications Inc., Other Affiliate Cox Enterprises Inc. for Cox Nebraska Telcom LLC. (lih)
April 16, 2012 Filing 22 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Cox Missouri Telcom LLC identifying Corporate Parent CoxCom LLC, Other Affiliate Cox Communications Inc., Other Affiliate Cox Enterprises Inc. for Cox Missouri Telcom LLC. (lih)
April 16, 2012 Filing 21 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Cox Maryland Telcom LLC identifying Corporate Parent CoxCom LLC, Other Affiliate Cox Communications Inc., Other Affiliate Cox Enterprises Inc. for Cox Maryland Telcom LLC. (lih)
April 16, 2012 Filing 20 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Cox Communications Louisiana LLC identifying Corporate Parent Cox Communications LLC Management Inc., Other Affiliate Cox Communications Inc., Other Affiliate Cox Enterprises Inc., Other Affiliate CoxCom LLC for Cox Communications Louisiana LLC. (lih)
April 16, 2012 Filing 19 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Cox Communications Gulf Coast LLC identifying Corporate Parent CoxCom LLC, Other Affiliate Cox Communications Inc., Other Affiliate Cox Enterprises Inc. for Cox Communications Gulf Coast LLC. (lih)
April 16, 2012 Filing 18 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Cox Communications Kansas Telcom LLC identifying Corporate Parent CoxCom LLC, Other Affiliate Cox Communications Inc., Other Affiliate Cox Enterprises Inc. for Cox Communications Kansas Telcom LLC. (lih)
April 16, 2012 Filing 17 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Cox Communications Kansas Telcom LLC identifying Corporate Parent CoxCom LLC, Other Affiliate Cox Communications Inc., Other Affiliate Cox Enterprises Inc. for Cox Communications Kansas Telcom LLC. (lih)
April 16, 2012 Filing 16 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Cox Idaho Telcom LLC identifying Corporate Parent CoxCom LLC, Other Affiliate Cox Communications Inc., Other Affiliate Cox Enterprises Inc. for Cox Idaho Telcom LLC. (lih)
April 16, 2012 Filing 15 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Cox Iowa Telcom LLC identifying Corporate Parent CoxCom LLC, Other Affiliate Cox Communications Inc., Other Affiliate Cox Enterprises Inc. for Cox Iowa Telcom LLC. (lih)
April 16, 2012 Filing 14 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Cox Communications Georgia LLC identifying Corporate Parent Cox Communications Inc., Other Affiliate Cox Enterprises Inc. for Cox Communications Georgia LLC. (lih)
April 16, 2012 Filing 13 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Cox Florida Telcom LP identifying Corporate Parent CoxCom LLC, Other Affiliate Cox Communications Inc., Other Affiliate Cox Enterprises Inc. for Cox Florida Telcom LP. (lih)
April 16, 2012 Filing 12 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Cox District of Columbia Telcom LLC identifying Corporate Parent CoxCom LLC, Other Affiliate Cox Communications Inc., Other Affiliate Cox Enterprises Inc. for Cox District of Columbia Telcom LLC. (lih)
April 16, 2012 Filing 11 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Cox Connecticut Telcom LLC identifying Corporate Parent CoxCom LLC, Other Affiliate Cox Communications Inc., Other Affiliate Cox Enterprises Inc. for Cox Connecticut Telcom LLC. (lih)
April 16, 2012 Filing 10 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Cox Colorado Telcom LLC identifying Corporate Parent CoxCom LLC, Other Affiliate Cox Communications Inc., Other Affiliate Cox Enterprises Inc. for Cox Colorado Telcom LLC. (lih)
April 16, 2012 Filing 9 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Cox Communications California LLC identifying Corporate Parent CoxCom LLC, Other Affiliate Cox Communications Inc., Other Affiliate Cox Enterprises Inc. for Cox Communications California LLC. (lih)
April 16, 2012 Filing 8 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Cox California Telcom LLC identifying Corporate Parent CoxCom LLC, Other Affiliate Cox Communications Inc., Other Affiliate Cox Enterprises Inc. for Cox California Telcom LLC. (lih)
April 16, 2012 Filing 7 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Cox Arizona Telcom LLC identifying Corporate Parent CoxCom LLC, Other Affiliate Cox Communications Inc., Other Affiliate Cox Enterprises Inc. for Cox Arizona Telcom LLC. (lih)
April 16, 2012 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by CoxCom LLC identifying Corporate Parent Cox Communications Inc., Other Affiliate Cox Enterprises Inc. for CoxCom LLC. (lih)
April 16, 2012 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Cox Arkansas Telcom LLC identifying Corporate Parent CoxCom LLC, Other Affiliate Cox Communications Inc., Other Affiliate Cox Enterprises Inc. for Cox Arkansas Telcom LLC. (lih)
April 16, 2012 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Cox Communications Arizona LLC identifying Corporate Parent CoxCom LLC, Other Affiliate Cox Communications Inc., Other Affiliate Cox Enterprises Inc. for Cox Communications Arizona LLC. (lih)
April 16, 2012 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,992,172; 7,836,474; 6,343,084; 6,633,561; 6,463,052; 6,452,932; 6,473,429; 6,298,064; 6,262,992; 6,330,224; 6,563,918; 6,639,912; 6,697,340; 7,286,561. (lih)
April 16, 2012 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction (lih)
April 16, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Sprint Communication Company LP, Sprint Solutions Inc., Sprint Spectrum LP - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0311-1057712.) - filed by Cox Nebraska Telcom LLC, Cox Communications Omaha LLC, Cox Arkansas Telcom LLC, Cox Communications Inc., Cox Rhode Island Telcom LLC, Cox California Telcom LLC, Cox Ohio Telcom LLC, Cox Communications Louisiana LLC, Cox Connecticut Telcom LLC, Cox District of Columbia Telcom LLC, Cox Iowa Telcom LLC, Cox Maryland Telcom LLC, Cox Kansas Telcom LLC, Cox Communications Arizona LLC, Cox Florida Telcom LP, Cox Communications Hampton Roads LLC, Cox North Carolina Telcom LLC, Cox Colorado Telcom LLC, Cox Communications Kansas Telcom LLC, Cox Arizona Telcom LLC, Cox Oklahoma Telcom LLC, Cox Missouri Telcom LLC, Cox Virginia Telcom LLC, Cox Louisiana Telcom LLC, Cox Communications Gulf Coast LLC, CoxCom LLC, Cox Communications Georgia LLC, Cox Georgia Telcom LLC, Cox Communications Las Vegas Inc., Cox Communications California LLC, Cox Idaho Telcom LLC, Cox Nevada Telcom LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Civil Cover Sheet)(lih)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cox Communications Inc. et al v. Sprint Communications Company LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cox Communications Inc.
Represented By: David S. Bloch
Represented By: Michael L. Brody
Represented By: Megan C. Haney
Represented By: Krishnan Padmanabhan
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Represented By: Pejman F. Sharifi
Represented By: James Winn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CoxCom LLC
Represented By: Megan C. Haney
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cox Arkansas Telcom LLC
Represented By: Megan C. Haney
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cox Communications Arizona LLC
Represented By: Megan C. Haney
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cox Arizona Telcom LLC
Represented By: Megan C. Haney
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cox California Telcom LLC
Represented By: Megan C. Haney
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cox Communications California LLC
Represented By: Megan C. Haney
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cox Colorado Telcom LLC
Represented By: Megan C. Haney
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cox Connecticut Telcom LLC
Represented By: Megan C. Haney
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cox District of Columbia Telcom LLC
Represented By: Megan C. Haney
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cox Florida Telcom LP
Represented By: Megan C. Haney
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cox Communications Georgia LLC
Represented By: Megan C. Haney
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cox Georgia Telcom LLC
Represented By: Megan C. Haney
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cox Iowa Telcom LLC
Represented By: Megan C. Haney
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cox Idaho Telcom LLC
Represented By: Megan C. Haney
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cox Communications Kansas LLC
Represented By: Megan C. Haney
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cox Kansas Telcom LLC
Represented By: Megan C. Haney
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cox Communications Gulf Coast LLC
Represented By: Megan C. Haney
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cox Communications Louisiana LLC
Represented By: Megan C. Haney
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cox Louisiana Telcom LLC
Represented By: Megan C. Haney
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cox Maryland Telcom LLC
Represented By: Megan C. Haney
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cox Missouri Telcom LLC
Represented By: Megan C. Haney
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cox Nebraska Telcom LLC
Represented By: Megan C. Haney
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cox Communications Omaha LLC
Represented By: Megan C. Haney
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cox Communications Las Vegas Inc.
Represented By: Megan C. Haney
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cox Nevada Telcom LLC
Represented By: Megan C. Haney
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cox North Carolina Telcom LLC
Represented By: Megan C. Haney
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cox Ohio Telcom LLC
Represented By: Megan C. Haney
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cox Oklahoma Telcom LLC
Represented By: Megan C. Haney
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cox Rhode Island Telcom LLC
Represented By: Megan C. Haney
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cox Communications Hampton Roads LLC
Represented By: Megan C. Haney
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cox Virginia Telcom LLC
Represented By: Megan C. Haney
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sprint Communication Company LP
Represented By: Richard K. Herrmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sprint Spectrum LP
Represented By: Richard K. Herrmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sprint Solutions Inc.
Represented By: Richard K. Herrmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?