Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation et al v. Power Integrations Inc.
Plaintiff: System General Corporation, Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation and Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation
Defendant: Power Integrations Inc.
Special Master: Allen M. -SM- Terrell, Jr.
Case Number: 1:2012cv00540
Filed: May 1, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: New Castle
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2018 Filing 619 Preliminary Jury Instructions. (ntl)
November 9, 2018 Filing 618 Voir Dire Questions. (ntl)
November 8, 2018 Filing 617 Proposed Jury Instructions by Power Integrations Inc. (Preliminary). (Mabey, Warren)
November 8, 2018 Filing 616 Proposed Voir Dire by Power Integrations Inc.. (Mabey, Warren)
November 8, 2018 CORRECTING ENTRY: D.I. 616 was removed from the docket per request of counsel (filed in wrong case). (ntl)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #615 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Pieter Sebastian de Ganon filed by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 11/2/18. (ntl)
November 2, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Pieter S. de Ganon for Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation and Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ceg)
November 1, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark - Pretrial Conference held on 11/1/2018. (Court Reporter B. Gaffigan.) (ntl)
November 1, 2018 Filing 615 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Pieter Sebastian de Ganon - filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Day, John)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 614 MEMORANDUM ORDER regarding motions in limine and other disputes in the PTO. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/31/18. (ntl)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 613 ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Pretrial Conference tomorrow will begin at 1:00 PM. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/31/18. (ntl)
October 30, 2018 Filing 612 Letter to Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Warren K. Mabey, Jr. regarding claim for worldwide damages. (Mabey, Warren)
October 29, 2018 Filing 611 Proposed Voir Dire by Power Integrations Inc.. (Mabey, Warren)
October 29, 2018 Filing 610 VERDICT SHEET by Power Integrations Inc. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A - PI Proposed Verdict Form, #2 Exhibit Ex B - FCS Proposed Verdict Form)(Mabey, Warren)
October 29, 2018 Filing 609 Proposed Jury Instructions by Power Integrations Inc. (Preliminary). (Mabey, Warren)
October 29, 2018 Filing 608 Proposed Jury Instructions by Power Integrations Inc. . (Mabey, Warren)
October 29, 2018 CORRECTING ENTRY: Corrected Exhibit 10 added to D.I. 606 per request of counsel. (ntl)
October 29, 2018 CORRECTING ENTRY: Exhibit 13-C added to D.I. 607 per request of counsel. (ntl)
October 25, 2018 Filing 607 [SEALED] Proposed Pretrial Order Volume II of II by Power Integrations Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 12A, #2 Exhibit 12B, #3 Exhibit 12C, #4 Exhibit 13A, #5 Exhibit 13B, #6 Exhibit 13C, #7 Exhibit 14, #8 Exhibit 15)(Mabey, Warren) (Attachment 6 replaced on 10/29/2018) (ntl).
October 25, 2018 Filing 606 Proposed Pretrial Order Volume I of II by Power Integrations Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11)(Mabey, Warren) (Attachment 10 replaced on 10/29/2018) (ntl).
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 605 MEMORANDUM ORDER re #586 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Power Integrations Inc. and #582 MOTION to Preclude Evidence under Daubert filed by Power Integrations Inc. are DENIED. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/25/18. (ntl)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 604 ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Pretrial Conference scheduled for November 1, 2018 will begin at 2:00 p.m. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/19/18. (ntl)
September 28, 2018 Filing 603 REDACTED VERSION of #601 Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Preclude Evidence under Daubert by Power Integrations Inc.. (Mabey, Warren)
September 21, 2018 Filing 602 REPLY BRIEF re #586 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Power Integrations Inc.. (McCann, Douglas)
September 21, 2018 Filing 601 [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re #582 MOTION to Preclude Evidence under Daubert filed by Power Integrations Inc.. (McCann, Douglas)
September 21, 2018 Filing 600 REDACTED VERSION of #594 Declaration (of Ryan J. Gatzemeyer) by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Day, John)
September 21, 2018 Filing 599 REDACTED VERSION of #593 Answering Brief in Opposition by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Day, John)
September 21, 2018 Filing 598 REDACTED VERSION of #596 Declaration (of Ryan J. Gatzemeyer) by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-7)(Day, John)
September 21, 2018 Filing 597 REDACTED VERSION of #595 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Day, John)
September 14, 2018 Filing 596 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #595 Answering Brief in Opposition, (Declaration of Ryan J. Gatzemeyer) by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-7)(Day, John)
September 14, 2018 Filing 595 [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #582 MOTION to Preclude Evidence under Daubert filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 9/21/2018. (Day, John)
September 14, 2018 Filing 594 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #593 Answering Brief in Opposition (Declaration of Ryan J. Gatzemeyer) by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Mayo, Andrew)
September 14, 2018 Filing 593 [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #586 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 9/21/2018. (Mayo, Andrew)
September 7, 2018 Filing 592 REDACTED VERSION of #585 Declaration Douglas McCann by Power Integrations Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-2)(McCann, Douglas)
September 7, 2018 Filing 591 REDACTED VERSION of #584 Opening Brief in Support of Daubert by Power Integrations Inc.. (McCann, Douglas)
September 7, 2018 Filing 590 REDACTED VERSION of #588 Declaration of Douglas McCann by Power Integrations Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(McCann, Douglas)
September 7, 2018 Filing 589 REDACTED VERSION of #587 Opening Brief in Support Summary Judgment by Power Integrations Inc.. (McCann, Douglas)
August 31, 2018 Filing 588 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #587 Opening Brief in Support of Douglas E. McCann In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment by Power Integrations Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(McCann, Douglas)
August 31, 2018 Filing 587 [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re #586 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Power Integrations Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 9/14/2018. (McCann, Douglas)
August 31, 2018 Filing 586 MOTION for Summary Judgment - filed by Power Integrations Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McCann, Douglas)
August 31, 2018 Filing 585 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #584 Opening Brief in Support of Douglas E. McCann in Support of Motion to Exclude Evidence under Daubert by Power Integrations Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-2)(McCann, Douglas)
August 31, 2018 Filing 584 [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re #582 MOTION to Preclude Evidence under Daubert filed by Power Integrations Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 9/14/2018. (McCann, Douglas)
August 31, 2018 Filing 583 PROPOSED ORDER Exclude Evidence under Daubert re #582 MOTION to Preclude Evidence under Daubert by Power Integrations Inc.. (McCann, Douglas)
August 31, 2018 Filing 582 MOTION to Preclude Evidence under Daubert - filed by Power Integrations Inc.. (McCann, Douglas)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #581 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John W. Thornburgh filed by Power Integrations Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/30/18. (ntl)
August 29, 2018 Filing 581 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John W. Thornburgh - filed by Power Integrations Inc.. (McCann, Douglas)
August 23, 2018 Filing 580 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation and Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation's Notice of Deposition of Mark A. Robinson filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation.(Day, John)
August 14, 2018 Filing 579 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation and Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation's Notice of Deposition of Arthur Kelley filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation.(Day, John)
August 14, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Scott F. Llewellyn,Ryan J. Gatzemeyer for Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (crb)
August 13, 2018 Filing 578 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rebuttal Expert Report of Robert B. Handfield, Ph.D. and Addendum to the Supplemental Rebuttal Expert Report of James E. Malackowski filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation.(Day, John)
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #577 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Scott F. Llewellyn and Ryan J. Gatzemeyer filed by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/10/18. (ntl)
August 9, 2018 Filing 577 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Scott F. Llewellyn and Ryan J. Gatzemeyer - filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Day, John)
July 19, 2018 Filing 576 NOTICE of Appearance by Warren K. Mabey, Jr on behalf of Power Integrations Inc. (Mabey, Warren)
July 19, 2018 Filing 575 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas Edward McCann on behalf of All Defendants (McCann, Douglas)
May 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 574 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Fact Discovery completed by 6/15/2018. Dispositive Motions due by 8/31/2018. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 10/25/2018. A Pretrial Conference is set for 11/1/2018 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 6B. Jury Trial on induced infringement and damages to begin 11/13/18. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/10/18. (ntl)
April 26, 2018 Filing 573 Joint STATUS REPORT by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Day, John)
April 26, 2018 Filing 572 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Patrick J. Stafford as co-counsel. Reason for request: no longer with firm. (Day, John)
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #571 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties to submit their joint status report and any proposed order to April 26, 2018 filed by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/25/18. (ntl)
April 24, 2018 Filing 571 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties to submit their joint status report and any proposed order to April 26, 2018 - filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Day, John)
April 23, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #570 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties to submit their joint status report and any proposed order to April 24, 2014 filed by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/23/18. (ntl)
April 20, 2018 Filing 570 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties to submit their joint status report and any proposed order to April 24, 2014 - filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Day, John)
April 18, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #569 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties to submit their joint status report and any proposed order to April 20, 2018 filed by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/18/18. (ntl)
April 13, 2018 Filing 569 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties to submit their joint status report and any proposed order to April 20, 2018 - filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Day, John)
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #568 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties to submit their joint status report and any proposed order to April 13, 2018 filed by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/9/18. (ntl)
April 6, 2018 Filing 568 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties to submit their joint status report and any proposed order to April 13, 2018 - filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Day, John)
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #567 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties to submit their joint status report and any proposed order to April 6, 2018 filed by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/26/18. (ntl)
March 23, 2018 Filing 567 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties to submit their joint status report and any proposed order to April 6, 2018 - filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Day, John)
March 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 566 ORDER re #565 Memorandum Opinion - #552 MOTION Final Judgment Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 58 filed by Power Integrations Inc. is DENIED. A Jury Trial is set for 11/13/2018 in Courtroom 6B before Judge Leonard P. Stark. See order for further information. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/16/2018. (etg)
March 16, 2018 Filing 565 MEMORANDUM OPINION re #552 MOTION Final Judgment Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 58 - filed by Power Integrations Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/16/2018. (etg)
March 12, 2018 Filing 564 Official Transcript of Oral Argument Hearing held on February 27, 2018 before Chief Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan, Telephone No. (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/2/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/12/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/11/2018.(bpg)
March 9, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #562 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties to submit their joint letter on trial scheduling to March 7, 2018 filed by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/9/18. (ntl)
March 7, 2018 Filing 563 Joint Letter to Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Joseph B. Warden regarding joint status report. (Warden, Joseph)
March 5, 2018 Filing 562 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties to submit their joint letter on trial scheduling to March 7, 2018 - filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Day, John)
February 27, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark - Oral Argument held on 2/27/2018. (Court Reporter B. Gaffigan.) (ntl)
February 23, 2018 Filing 561 Letter to Honorable Chief Judge Leonard P. Stark from Joseph B. Warden regarding response to request to reschedule Pretrial Conference - re #560 Letter. (Warden, Joseph)
February 20, 2018 Filing 560 Letter to The Honorable Chief Judge Leonard P. Stark from John D. Day regarding request to move the date of the pretrial conference due to lead counsel's conflict on May 16, 2018. (Day, John)
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #559 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Colette Reiner Mayer filed by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 2/14/18. (ntl)
February 13, 2018 Filing 559 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Colette Reiner Mayer - filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Day, John)
February 8, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Joshua Engel for Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.,Joshua Engel for Fairchild Semiconductor International Inc.,Joshua Engel for Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01371-LPS, 1:08-cv-00309-LPS, 1:12-cv-00540-LPS(dmp, )
February 2, 2018 Filing 558 REPLY BRIEF re #552 MOTION Final Judgment Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 58 filed by Power Integrations Inc.. (Warden, Joseph)
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 557 ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Pretrial Conference is rescheduled for 5/16/2018 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 6B. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/23/18. (ntl)
January 19, 2018 Filing 556 DECLARATION re #555 Answering Brief in Opposition, (Declaration of Christina A. Ondrick) by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Day, John)
January 19, 2018 Filing 555 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #552 MOTION Final Judgment Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 58 filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 1/26/2018. (Day, John)
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (963 in 1:04-cv-01371-LPS, 847 in 1:08-cv-00309-LPS) (554 in 1:12-cv-00540-LPS) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Joshua Engel filed by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/10/18. Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01371-LPS, 1:08-cv-00309-LPS, 1:12-cv-00540-LPS (ntl)
January 9, 2018 Filing 554 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Joshua Engel - filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Day, John)
January 5, 2018 Filing 553 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #552 MOTION Final Judgment Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 58 filed by Power Integrations Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 1/19/2018. (Warden, Joseph)
January 5, 2018 Filing 552 MOTION Final Judgment Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 58 - filed by Power Integrations Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Final Judgment)(Warden, Joseph)
December 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 551 ORAL ORDER: Having reviewed the parties' joint status report (D.I. #550 ), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: (i) PI may file a motion for entry of final judgment and, should it do so, briefing shall be according to the schedule and lengths proposed by PI, and the Court will hear argument on the motion on February 27, 2018 at 9:00 a.m., each side allocated forty-five (45) minutes; and (ii) a jury trial, not to exceed three (3) days, should a trial be necessary, will begin on June 5, 2018, with the proposed final pretrial order due on May 8, 2018 and the pretrial conference to be held on May 18, 2018 at 2:00 p.m. Ordered by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/28/2017. (etg)
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #549 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties to submit the joint status report to December 19, 2017 filed by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/20/2017. (etg)
December 19, 2017 Filing 550 Joint STATUS REPORT by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Day, John)
December 18, 2017 Filing 549 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties to submit the joint status report to December 19, 2017 - filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Day, John)
December 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 548 ORAL ORDER: Consistent with the Federal Circuit's ruling dismissing Defendant's appeal (see D.I. 23 in Fed. Cir. Appeal No. 17-2327), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' motion to strike (D.I. 535) is GRANTED. The parties shall submit a joint status report by December 18, 2017, with their view(s) as to how this case should now proceed. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/8/17. (ntl)
October 11, 2017 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Jennifer L. Nall for Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (lmm)
October 10, 2017 Filing 547 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jennifer Librach Nall - filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Mayo, Andrew)
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #547 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jennifer Librach Nall filed by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/10/17. (ntl)
September 15, 2017 Filing 546 Official Transcript of Telephone Conference held on September 11, 2017 before Chief Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/6/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/16/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/14/2017. (bpg)
September 11, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark - Telephone Conference held on 9/11/2017. (Court Reporter B. Gaffigan.) (ntl)
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 545 ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a teleconference has been scheduled for September 11, 2017 at 12:15 p.m. regarding the motion to strike (D.I. 535). No further submissions are needed. Counsel for Plaintiff(s) shall initiate the teleconference call to 302-573-4571. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/1/17. (ntl)
August 22, 2017 Filing 544 Official Transcript of Status Telephone Conference held on July 12, 2017 before Chief Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/12/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/22/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/20/2017. (bpg)
August 9, 2017 Filing 543 NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA for the Federal Circuit re #539 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit), filed by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation. USCA Case Number 17-2405. (ntl)
August 8, 2017 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Michael A. Hawes for Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ceg)
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #540 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael Hawes filed by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/8/17. (ntl)
August 7, 2017 Filing 542 Letter to The Honorable Chief Judge Leonard P. Stark from Andrew C. Mayo regarding request for the scheduling of a teleconference to address Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike. (Mayo, Andrew)
August 7, 2017 Filing 541 Letter to The Honorable Chief Judge Leonard P. Stark from Andrew C. Mayo regarding Plaintiffs' reply brief in support of motion to strike - re #535 MOTION to Strike #532 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit), . (Mayo, Andrew)
August 7, 2017 Filing 540 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael Hawes - filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Day, John)
August 7, 2017 Notification regarding #539 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit), sent to Reporter Gaffigan (ceg)
August 7, 2017 Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit re #539 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit). (ceg)
August 7, 2017 Notification regarding #539 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit), sent to Reporter Gunning (ceg)
August 4, 2017 Filing 539 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Federal Circuit of #339 Order, #88 Order, #484 Memorandum and Order, #427 Judgment, #331 Memorandum and Order, #267 Order, #87 Memorandum Opinion, #338 Memorandum Opinion, #52 Memorandum Opinion, #266 Memorandum Opinion, #53 Order,, #332 Memorandum and Order, #296 Order, #295 Memorandum Opinion . Appeal filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Day, John)
August 4, 2017 APPEAL - Credit Card Payment of $505.00 received re #539 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit), filed by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation. ( Filing fee $505, receipt number 0311-2197124.) (Day, John)
August 2, 2017 Filing 538 Letter to Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Wlliam J. Marsden, Jr. regarding Fairchild Motion to Strike - re #536 Letter, #535 MOTION to Strike #532 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit), . (Marsden, William)
July 28, 2017 Filing 537 Joint STATUS REPORT by Power Integrations Inc.. (Marsden, William)
July 26, 2017 Filing 536 Letter to The Honorable Chief Judge Leonard P. Stark from John G. Day regarding Fairchild's Motion to Strike Notice of Appeal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Day, John)
July 26, 2017 Filing 535 MOTION to Strike #532 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit), - filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Day, John)
July 26, 2017 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #534 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties to submit the joint status report to July 28, 2017 filed by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/25/17. (ntl)
July 21, 2017 Filing 534 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties to submit the joint status report to July 28, 2017 - filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Day, John)
July 21, 2017 Filing 533 NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA for the Federal Circuit re #532 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit), filed by Power Integrations Inc. USCA Case Number 17-2327. (ntl)
July 21, 2017 Filing 532 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Federal Circuit of #330 Order, #329 Memorandum Opinion, #266 Memorandum Opinion, #88 Order, #484 Memorandum and Order, #427 Judgment, #331 Memorandum and Order, #267 Order, #87 Memorandum Opinion as well as D.I. 401 and D.I. 400. Appeal filed by Power Integrations Inc.. (Marsden, William)
July 21, 2017 APPEAL - Credit Card Payment of $505.00 received re #532 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit), filed by Power Integrations Inc.. ( Filing fee $505, receipt number 0311-2187032.) (Marsden, William)
July 21, 2017 Notification regarding #532 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit), sent to Reporter Gaffigan (nmg)
July 21, 2017 Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit re #532 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit). (nmg)
July 21, 2017 Notification regarding #532 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit), sent to Reporter Gunning (nmg)
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 531 ORDER Granting #520 MOTION to Vacate the Judgment of Inducement Pursuant to Rule 60 filed by Power Integrations Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/13/17. (ntl)
July 12, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark - Telephone Conference held on 7/12/2017. (Court Reporter B. Gaffigan.) Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-00309-LPS, 1:12-cv-00540-LPS (ntl)
July 11, 2017 Filing 530 Joint Letter to Honorable Leonard P. Stark from William J. Marsden, Jr. regarding Joint Status Report. (Marsden, William)
July 7, 2017 Filing 529 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to submit a Joint Status Report to July 11, 2017 - filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Mayo, Andrew) Modified on 7/7/2017 (etg).
July 7, 2017 CORRECTING ENTRY: As per counsel's request, the docket text of DI 838 (DI 529 in 1:12-cv-00540-LPS) has been amended to correct the year. Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-00309-LPS, 1:12-cv-00540-LPS(etg)
July 7, 2017 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (838 in 1:08-cv-00309-LPS, 529 in 1:12-cv-00540-LPS) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to submit a Joint Status Report to July 11, 2017 filed by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/7/17. Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-00309-LPS, 1:12-cv-00540-LPS(etg)
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 528 ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Court will hold a status teleconference on July 12 at 3:30 p.m. The parties shall file a joint status report by July 7. Counsel for Fairchild shall initiate the call to (302) 573-4571. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 6/22/17. Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-00309-LPS, 1:12-cv-00540-LPS (ntl)
June 16, 2017 Filing 527 Joint Letter to Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Joseph B. Warden regarding requesting status conference. (Warden, Joseph)
May 10, 2017 Filing 526 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation (Day, John)
January 11, 2017 Filing 525 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Charles J. Hawkins as co-counsel. Reason for request: no longer with firm. (Mayo, Andrew)
January 6, 2017 Filing 524 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation (Maguire, Lauren)
December 30, 2016 Filing 523 STATEMENT of Non-Opposition to Power Integrations' Motion to Vacate the Judgment of Inducement Pursuant to Rule 60, by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Mayo, Andrew)
December 29, 2016 Filing 522 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent ON Semiconductor Corporation for Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Mayo, Andrew)
December 21, 2016 Filing 521 Letter to The Honorable Chief Judge Leonard P. Stark from John G. Day regarding Federal Circuit Decision in C.A. No. 08-309-LPS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Day, John)
December 16, 2016 Filing 520 MOTION to Vacate the Judgment of Inducement Pursuant to Rule 60 - filed by Power Integrations Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Marsden, William)
December 12, 2016 Filing 519 Letter to Honorable Leonard P. Stark from William J. Marsden, Jr. regarding supplemental authority. (Marsden, William) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/12/2016: #1 Opinion) (ntl).
December 11, 2016 Filing 518 Official Transcript of Oral Argument Hearing held on December 2, 2016 before Chief Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/3/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/11/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/13/2017.(bpg)
December 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 517 ORAL ORDER: For the reasons stated during the December 2, 2016 hearing, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: (i) Fairchild's motion for a permanent injunction (D.I. 491) is DENIED; (ii) Fairchild's alternative motion for an ongoing royalty (D.I. 491) is GRANTED, subject to the Court's decision on the amount of the royalty, to be outlined in a forthcoming order; and (iii) Fairchild's motion for attorney fees and costs (D.I. 495) is DENIED. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/5/16. (ntl)
December 2, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark - Oral Argument held on 12/2/2016. (Court Reporter B. Gaffigan.) Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01371-LPS, 1:12-cv-00540-LPS (ntl)
December 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 516 ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the hearing tomorrow, December 2, will begin at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 2A before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/01/16. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-00540-LPS, 1:04-cv-01371-LPS(etg)
October 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 515 ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Court will hear oral argument on the pending motions on December 2, 2016 beginning at 1:00 p.m. Each side will be allocated up to one (1) hour to present its argument. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/21/16. Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01371-LPS, 1:12-cv-00540-LPS (ntl)
August 31, 2016 Filing 514 Letter to The Honorable Chief Judge Leonard P. Stark from John G. Day regarding request for oral argument on Fairchild's renewed motion for permanent injunction (D.I. 491) and Fairchild's renewed motion for attorneys' fees (D.I. 495). (Day, John)
August 19, 2016 Filing 513 REDACTED VERSION of #510 Reply Brief, by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Mayo, Andrew)
August 19, 2016 Filing 512 REDACTED VERSION of #511 Reply Brief by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Mayo, Andrew)
August 12, 2016 Filing 511 [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re #495 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Day, John)
August 12, 2016 Filing 510 [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re #491 MOTION for Permanent Injunction (Plaintiffs' Motion for Entry of a Permanent Injunction or in the Alternative an Ongoing Royalty) filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Day, John)
August 11, 2016 Filing 509 REDACTED VERSION of #506 Declaration, of William J. Marsden, Jr. in support of Power Integrations Opposition to Fairchild's Motion for Entry of a Permanent Injunction by Power Integrations Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Marsden, William)
August 11, 2016 Filing 508 REDACTED VERSION of #505 Answering Brief in Opposition, Fairchild's Motion for Entry of a Permanent Injunction by Power Integrations Inc.. (Marsden, William)
August 11, 2016 Filing 507 REDACTED VERSION of #503 Answering Brief in Opposition in Opposition to Fairchild's Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs by Power Integrations Inc.. (Marsden, William)
August 5, 2016 Filing 506 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #505 Answering Brief in Opposition, of William J. Marsden, Jr. In support of Power Integrations Opposition to Fairchild's Motion for Permanent Injunction by Power Integrations Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-G)(Marsden, William)
August 5, 2016 Filing 505 [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #491 MOTION for Permanent Injunction (Plaintiffs' Motion for Entry of a Permanent Injunction or in the Alternative an Ongoing Royalty) filed by Power Integrations Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 8/15/2016. (Marsden, William)
August 5, 2016 Filing 504 DECLARATION re #503 Answering Brief in Opposition of William J. Marsden, Jr. by Power Integrations Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E)(Marsden, William)
August 5, 2016 Filing 503 [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #495 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs filed by Power Integrations Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 8/15/2016. (Marsden, William)
July 22, 2016 Filing 502 REDACTED VERSION of #493 Declaration,, (of Christina A. Ondrick) by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16 part 1, #17 Exhibit 16 part 2, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20 part 1, #22 Exhibit 20 part 2, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22)(Maguire, Lauren)
July 22, 2016 Filing 501 REDACTED VERSION of #494 Declaration of James E. Malackowski by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Maguire, Lauren)
July 22, 2016 Filing 500 REDACTED VERSION of #492 Opening Brief in Support, by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Maguire, Lauren)
July 22, 2016 Filing 499 REDACTED VERSION of #497 Declaration, (of Christina A. Ondrick) by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-12)(Maguire, Lauren)
July 22, 2016 Filing 498 REDACTED VERSION of #496 Opening Brief in Support, by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Maguire, Lauren)
July 15, 2016 Filing 497 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #496 Opening Brief in Support, (Declaration of Christina A. Ondrick) by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12)(Maguire, Lauren)
July 15, 2016 Filing 496 [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re #495 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 8/1/2016. (Maguire, Lauren)
July 15, 2016 Filing 495 [SEALED] MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs - filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Maguire, Lauren)
July 15, 2016 Filing 494 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #492 Opening Brief in Support, (Declaration of James E. Malackowski) by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Maguire, Lauren)
July 15, 2016 Filing 493 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #492 Opening Brief in Support, (Declaration of Christina A. Ondrick) by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16 (Part I of II), #17 Exhibit 16 (Part II of II), #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20 (Part I of II), #22 Exhibit 20 (Part II of II), #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22)(Maguire, Lauren)
July 15, 2016 Filing 492 [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re #491 MOTION for Permanent Injunction (Plaintiffs' Motion for Entry of a Permanent Injunction or in the Alternative an Ongoing Royalty) filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 8/1/2016. (Maguire, Lauren)
July 15, 2016 Filing 491 [SEALED] MOTION for Permanent Injunction (Plaintiffs' Motion for Entry of a Permanent Injunction or in the Alternative an Ongoing Royalty) - filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Maguire, Lauren)
June 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 490 ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the proposed schedule set forth in the Joint Status Report (D.I. 489) is ADOPTED. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 6/27/16. (ntl)
June 24, 2016 Filing 489 Joint STATUS REPORT by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Day, John)
June 22, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (923 in 1:04-cv-01371-LPS, 488 in 1:12-cv-00540-LPS) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to file the proposed orders to June 24, 2016 filed by Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 6/22/16. Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01371-LPS, 1:12-cv-00540-LPS (ntl)
June 20, 2016 Filing 488 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to file the proposed orders to June 24, 2016 - filed by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. (Day, John)
June 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 487 ORAL ORDER: Having reviewed the parties' joint status report (D.I. 486), the parties are ADVISED that: (1) the Court is inclined to defer consideration of an accounting or supplemental damages until after resolution of an appeal, and is not inclined to order Power to provide updated financial information at this time; (2) the parties should be able, through good faith efforts, to resolve disputes relating to prejudgment and post-judgment interest; (3) the Court is inclined to deny Fairchild's motion for attorney fees and costs; (4) the Court is inclined to deny Fairchild's request for permanent injunction; and (5) the Court is inclined to deny Power's request to find this case "exceptional." IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall, no later than June 20, submit a proposed order with a schedule for briefing any motions that will be filed or renewed, indicating whether the Court will receive new briefing and, if not, which previously-filed briefs address the issues ripe for decision. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 6/14/16. (ntl)
March 31, 2016 Filing 486 Joint STATUS REPORT by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Day, John)
March 31, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (485 in 1:12-cv-00540-LPS, 920 in 1:04-cv-01371-LPS) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to file Joint Status Reports to March 31, 2016 filed by Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/31/16. Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01371-LPS, 1:12-cv-00540-LPS (ntl)
March 30, 2016 Filing 485 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to file Joint Status Reports to March 31, 2016 - filed by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation(a Delaware corporation), Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.(a Delaware corporation), Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. (Day, John)
March 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 484 MEMORANDUM ORDER DENYING re #437 MOTION for New Trial; #466 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law and MOTION for New Trial. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/24/16. (ntl)
February 24, 2016 Filing 483 Official Transcript of Oral Argument Hearing held on January 26, 2016 before Chief Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/16/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/28/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/24/2016. (bpg)
January 26, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark - Oral Argument held on 1/26/2016. (Court Reporter B. Gaffigan.) Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01371-LPS, 1:12-cv-00540-LPS (ntl)
December 4, 2015 Filing 482 Certain Physical EXHIBITS RETURNED to counsel for Power Integrations. (ntl)
October 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 481 ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Oral Argument is set for 1/26/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 6B regarding: 1) the pending post-trial motions in C.A. No. 12-540 (D.I. 437, 466), and 2) the construction of "soft start circuit" in the original '366 patent in light of the Federal Circuit's mandate in C.A. No. 04-1371 (D.I. 810). Each side shall have a total of one (1) hour to divide amongst these issues as it wishes. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/22/15. Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01371-LPS, 1:12-cv-00540-LPS (ntl)
October 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 480 ORAL ORDER: Having received PI's consolidated post-trial motion (D.I. 466) pursuant to the Court's orders (D.I. 449, 463), PI's original post-trial motions (D.I. 428, 431, 434) are HEREBY DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/22/15. (ntl)
October 9, 2015 Filing 479 REPLY BRIEF re #437 MOTION for New Trial filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Day, John)
October 9, 2015 Filing 478 REPLY BRIEF re #466 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law of no induced infringement of the '972 patent MOTION for New Trial as to both direct and indirect infringement of '457 patent filed by Power Integrations Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A)(Marsden, William)
October 5, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #477 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties to file and serve reply briefs in support of their respective motions for judgment as a matter of law and/or new trial (D.I. 437, 466) to October 9, 2015 filed by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/5/15. (ntl)
October 2, 2015 Filing 477 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties to file and serve reply briefs in support of their respective motions for judgment as a matter of law and/or new trial (D.I. 437, 466) to October 9, 2015 - filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Day, John)
September 29, 2015 Filing 476 REDACTED VERSION of #473 Declaration, of William J. Marsden, Jr. by Power Integrations Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-2)(Marsden, William)
September 29, 2015 Filing 475 REDACTED VERSION of #472 Answering Brief in Opposition to Fairchild's Motion for a New Trial by Power Integrations Inc.. (Marsden, William)
September 21, 2015 Filing 474 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #466 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law of no induced infringement of the '972 patent MOTION for New Trial as to both direct and indirect infringement of '457 patent filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, System General Corporation.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 10/1/2015. (Day, John)
September 21, 2015 Filing 473 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #472 Answering Brief in Opposition of William J. Marsden, Jr. In Support of Opposition to Fairchild's Motion for a New Trial by Power Integrations Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-2)(Marsden, William)
September 21, 2015 Filing 472 [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #437 MOTION for New Trial filed by Power Integrations Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 10/1/2015. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Marsden, William)
September 14, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #471 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties to file and serve answering briefs in opposition to their respective motions for judgment as a matter of law and/or new trial (D.I. 437, 466) to September 21, 2015 filed by System General Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/14/15. (ntl)
September 11, 2015 Filing 471 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties to file and serve answering briefs in opposition to their respective motions for judgment as a matter of law and/or new trial (D.I. 437, 466) to September 21, 2015 - filed by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, System General Corporation. (Day, John)
September 2, 2015 Filing 470 REDACTED VERSION of #468 Declaration, of William J. Marsden, Jr. by Power Integrations Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B-D, #3 Exhibit E-G)(Marsden, William)
September 2, 2015 Filing 469 REDACTED VERSION of #467 Opening Brief in Support, no induced infringement of the '972 patent MOTION for New Trial as to both direct and indirect infringement of '457 patent by Power Integrations Inc.. (Marsden, William)
August 31, 2015 Filing 468 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #467 Opening Brief in Support, by Power Integrations Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Marsden, William)
August 31, 2015 Filing 467 [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re #466 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law of no induced infringement of the '972 patent MOTION for New Trial as to both direct and indirect infringement of '457 patent filed by Power Integrations Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 9/17/2015. (Marsden, William)
August 31, 2015 Filing 466 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law of no induced infringement of the '972 patent, MOTION for New Trial as to both direct and indirect infringement of '457 patent - filed by Power Integrations Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Marsden, William)
August 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 465 ORAL ORDER: Having reviewed the parties letters of yesterday (D.I. 462, 464), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following motions are DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to renew according to the procedure described below: D.I. 439, 447, 452, 453, 454, 455. Under the circumstances, it will be most efficient for these motions to be renewed (if at all) and briefed after the Court has resolved the pending motions for judgment as a matter of law and/or a new trial. The parties are further ORDERED to submit a joint status report no later than ten (10) days after the Court resolves the last of the motions for judgment as a matter of law and/or a new trial, and that report shall list any additional motions either party intends to file and their proposals for briefing such motions. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/28/15. (ntl)
August 26, 2015 Filing 464 Letter to The Honorable Chief Judge Leonard P. Stark from John G. Day regarding response to Power Integrations' 8/26/15 letter request to strike Fairchild's motions - re #462 Letter,. (Day, John)
August 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 463 ORDER re briefing schedule for Defendant's consolidated motion. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/26/15. (ntl)
August 26, 2015 Filing 462 Letter to Honorable Leonard P. Stark from William J. Marsden, Jr. regarding untimely briefing submissions - re #455 MOTION for Permanent Injunction or Ongoing Royalty , #453 MOTION for Prejudgment and Postjudgment Interest , #452 MOTION for an Accounting and Supplemental Damages . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Marsden, William)
August 25, 2015 Filing 461 Letter to The Honorable Chief Judge Leonard P. Stark from John G. Day regarding briefing on certain post-trial motions. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Day, John)
August 21, 2015 Filing 460 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #457 Opening Brief in Support, (of Christina A. Ondrick) by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16 Part 1, #17 Exhibit 16 Part 2, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20 Part 1, #22 Exhibit 20 Part 2, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22)(Mayo, Andrew)
August 21, 2015 Filing 459 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #453 MOTION for Prejudgment and Postjudgment Interest , #454 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs, #455 MOTION for Permanent Injunction or Ongoing Royalty , #452 MOTION for an Accounting and Supplemental Damages (of Christina A. Ondrick) by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12)(Day, John)
August 21, 2015 Filing 458 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #455 MOTION for Permanent Injunction or Ongoing Royalty , #453 MOTION for Prejudgment and Postjudgment Interest , #452 MOTION for an Accounting and Supplemental Damages , #454 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs (of James E. Malackowski) by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Day, John)
August 21, 2015 Filing 457 [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re #455 MOTION for Permanent Injunction or Ongoing Royalty filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 9/8/2015. (Mayo, Andrew)
August 21, 2015 Filing 456 [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re #454 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 9/8/2015. (Day, John)
August 21, 2015 Filing 455 [SEALED] MOTION for Permanent Injunction or Ongoing Royalty - filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Mayo, Andrew)
August 21, 2015 Filing 454 [SEALED] MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs - filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Day, John)
August 21, 2015 Filing 453 [SEALED] MOTION for Prejudgment and Postjudgment Interest - filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Day, John)
August 21, 2015 Filing 452 [SEALED] MOTION for an Accounting and Supplemental Damages - filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Day, John)
August 21, 2015 Filing 451 Letter to Honorable Leonard P. Stark from William J. Marsden, Jr. regarding page limits of briefing - re #446 Letter. (Marsden, William)
August 21, 2015 Filing 450 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #448 Opening Brief in Support, of William J. Marsden, Jr. In Support of Power Integrations' Motion Requesting A Declaration That This Case is Exceptional by Power Integrations Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D)(Marsden, William)
August 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 449 ORAL ORDER by Judge Leonard P. Stark: Having reviewed Fairchild's letter of August 20 (D.I. #446 ), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that PI's briefs in support of its post-trial motions shall be REFILED as a single brief, not to exceed twenty (20) pages in total, consistent with Judge Stark's current patent procedures. While admittedly unclear, it was the Court's intent that the new procedures govern here, and the Court perceives no reason to depart from those procedures under the specific circumstances. Accordingly, the parties shall meet and confer and shall, no later than August 25, file a proposed order to modify the briefing schedule and make clear the applicable page limits. (rpg)
August 21, 2015 Filing 448 [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re #447 MOTION Requesting a Finding That This Case is Exceptional and an Award of Fees Pursuant to Section 285 filed by Power Integrations Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 9/8/2015. (Marsden, William)
August 21, 2015 Filing 447 MOTION Requesting a Finding That This Case is Exceptional and an Award of Fees Pursuant to Section 285 - filed by Power Integrations Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Marsden, William)
August 20, 2015 Filing 446 Letter to The Honorable Chief Judge Leonard P. Stark from John G. Day regarding post-trial briefing. (Day, John)
August 19, 2015 Filing 445 REDACTED VERSION of #441 Declaration,, of William J. Marsden, Jr. in Support of Motion for Entry of a Permanent Injunction by Power Integrations Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-F, #2 Exhibit G, #3 Exhibit H, #4 Exhibit I, #5 Exhibit J-L, #6 Exhibit M, #7 Exhibit N, #8 Exhibit O)(Marsden, William)
August 19, 2015 Filing 444 REDACTED VERSION of #440 Opening Brief in Support, in Support of Power Integrations' Motion for Entry of a Permanent Injunction by Power Integrations Inc.. (Marsden, William)
August 19, 2015 Filing 443 REDACTED VERSION of #436 Declaration, of William J. Marsden, Jr. In Support of Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law of No Induced Infringement of the '972 Patent or Alternatively for a New Trial by Power Integrations Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-F)(Marsden, William)
August 19, 2015 Filing 442 REDACTED VERSION of #435 Opening Brief in Support, Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law of No Induced Infringement of the '972 Patent or Alternatively for a New Trial by Power Integrations Inc.. (Marsden, William)
August 12, 2015 Filing 441 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #440 Opening Brief in Support, of William J. Marsden, Jr. In Support of Power Integrations Post Trial Motion for Entry of a Permanent Injunction by Power Integrations Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O)(Marsden, William)
August 12, 2015 Filing 440 [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re #439 MOTION for Permanent Injunction (Post Trial) of the '359 Patent filed by Power Integrations Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 8/31/2015. (Marsden, William)
August 12, 2015 Filing 439 MOTION for Permanent Injunction (Post Trial) of the '359 Patent - filed by Power Integrations Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Marsden, William)
August 12, 2015 Filing 438 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #437 MOTION for New Trial filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 8/31/2015. (Maguire, Lauren)
August 12, 2015 Filing 437 MOTION for New Trial - filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Maguire, Lauren)
August 12, 2015 Filing 436 [SEALED] DECLARATION of William J. Marsden, Jr. In Support of Power Integrations' Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law of No Induced Infringement of the '972 Patent or Alternatively for a New Trial by Power Integrations Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Marsden, William)
August 12, 2015 Filing 435 [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re #434 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law of No Induced Infringement of the '972 Patent or Alternatively for a New Trial filed by Power Integrations Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 8/31/2015. (Marsden, William)
August 12, 2015 Filing 434 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law of No Induced Infringement of the '972 Patent or Alternatively for a New Trial - filed by Power Integrations Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Marsden, William)
August 12, 2015 Filing 433 DECLARATION re #432 Opening Brief in Support, of William J. Marsden, Jr. In Support of Power Integrations' Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law and Remittitur or, Alternatively, a New Trial on Damages for US Patent No. 7,259,972 by Power Integrations Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Marsden, William)
August 12, 2015 Filing 432 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #431 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law and Remittitur or, Alternatively a New Trial on Damages for US Patent No. 7,259,972 filed by Power Integrations Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 8/31/2015. (Marsden, William)
August 12, 2015 Filing 431 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law and Remittitur or, Alternatively a New Trial on Damages for US Patent No. 7,259,972 - filed by Power Integrations Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Marsden, William)
August 12, 2015 Filing 430 DECLARATION re #429 Opening Brief in Support of William J. Marsden, Jr. In Support of Power Integrations' Motion for a New Trial on Infringement of the '457 Patent by Power Integrations Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Marsden, William)
August 12, 2015 Filing 429 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #428 MOTION for New Trial on Infringement of US Patent 8,111,457 filed by Power Integrations Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 8/31/2015. (Marsden, William)
August 12, 2015 Filing 428 MOTION for New Trial on Infringement of US Patent 8,111,457 - filed by Power Integrations Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Marsden, William)
August 7, 2015 Filing 427 JUDGMENT (See document for further information). Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/7/15. (ntl)
July 17, 2015 Filing 426 Letter to Honorable Leonard P. Stark from William J. Marsden, Jr. regarding proposed form of Judgment - re #425 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Marsden, William)
July 15, 2015 Filing 425 Letter to The Honorable Chief Judge Leonard P. Stark from Lauren E. Maguire regarding Fairchild's supplemental submission on proposed form of judgment. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Maguire, Lauren)
July 15, 2015 Filing 424 Official Transcript of Jury Trial - Volume I (including jury verdict) held on June 5, 2015 before Chief Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/5/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/17/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/13/2015. (bpg)
July 15, 2015 Filing 423 Official Transcript of Jury Trial - Volume H held on June 4, 2015 before Chief Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/5/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/17/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/13/2015. (bpg)
July 15, 2015 Filing 422 Official Transcript of Jury Trial - Volume G held on June 3, 2015 before Chief Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/5/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/17/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/13/2015. (bpg)
July 15, 2015 Filing 421 Official Transcript of Jury Trial - Volume F held on June 2, 2015 before Chief Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/5/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/17/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/13/2015. (bpg)
July 15, 2015 Filing 420 Official Transcript of Jury Trial - Volume E held on June 1, 2015 before Chief Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/5/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/17/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/13/2015. (bpg)
July 15, 2015 Filing 419 Official Transcript of Jury Trial - Volume D held on May 29, 2015 before Chief Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/5/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/17/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/13/2015. (bpg)
July 15, 2015 Filing 418 Official Transcript of Jury Trial - Volume C held on May 28, 2015 before Chief Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/5/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/17/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/13/2015. (bpg)
July 15, 2015 Filing 417 Official Transcript of Jury Trial - Volume B held on May 27, 2015 before Chief Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/5/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/17/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/13/2015. (bpg)
July 15, 2015 Filing 416 Official Transcript of Jury Trial - Volume A held on May 26, 2015 before Chief Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/5/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/17/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/13/2015. (bpg)
July 10, 2015 Filing 415 Letter to Counsel from Judge Leonard P. Stark regarding JMOL and new trial motions. (rpg)
June 25, 2015 Filing 414 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from William J. Marsden, Jr. regarding Power Integration's proposed form of judgment - re #413 Letter. (Marsden, William)
June 24, 2015 Filing 413 Letter to The Honorable Chief Judge Leonard P. Stark from Andrew C. Mayo regarding Power Integrations' Proposed Final Judgment. (Mayo, Andrew)
June 18, 2015 Filing 412 STATUS REPORT by Power Integrations Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Form of Order Entering Judgment)(Marsden, William)
June 18, 2015 Filing 411 STATUS REPORT by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Judgment Following Jury Trial)(Day, John)
June 16, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #406 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for parties to file joint status report to June 18, 2015 filed by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 6/16/15. (ntl)
June 11, 2015 Filing 410 REDACTED VERSION of #375 Letter, by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D)(Mayo, Andrew)
June 11, 2015 Filing 409 REDACTED VERSION of #384 Letter, by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-I)(Mayo, Andrew)
June 11, 2015 Filing 408 REDACTED VERSION of #387 Letter by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D)(Mayo, Andrew)
June 11, 2015 Filing 407 REDACTED VERSION of #388 Letter, by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-G)(Mayo, Andrew)
June 11, 2015 Filing 406 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for parties to file joint status report to June 18, 2015 - filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Day, John)
June 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 405 ORDER directing that jurors be provided lunch (cc: Finance). Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 6/8/15. (ntl)
June 8, 2015 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER: For the reasons stated in Court, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Fairchild's motion to preclude (D.I. 356) is DENIED. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 6/8/15. (ntl)
June 5, 2015 Filing 404 [SEALED] Jury Notes. (rpg)
June 5, 2015 Filing 403 REDACTED VERSION of #402 Jury Verdict. (ntl)
June 5, 2015 Filing 402 [SEALED] JURY VERDICT. (ntl)
June 5, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark - Jury Trial completed on 6/5/2015. (Court Reporter B. Gaffigan.) (ntl)
June 4, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark - Jury Trial held on 6/4/2015. (Court Reporter B. Gaffigan.) (ntl)
June 4, 2015 Filing 401 VERDICT SHEET for jury trial that commenced on 5/25/2015. (rpg)
June 4, 2015 Filing 400 FINAL Jury Instructions for jury trial that commenced on 5/25/2015. (rpg)
June 4, 2015 Filing 399 Letter to Honorable Leonard P. Stark from William J. Marsden, Jr. regarding Jury instructions. (Marsden, William)
June 3, 2015 Filing 398 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from John G. Day regarding Power Integrations' closing - re #397 Letter. (Day, John)
June 3, 2015 Filing 397 Letter to Honorable Leonard P. Stark from William J. Marsden, Jr. regarding closing. (Marsden, William)
June 3, 2015 Filing 396 [SEALED] Letter to Honorable Leonard P. Stark from William J. Marsden, Jr. regarding Dr. Wei. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Marsden, William)
June 3, 2015 Filing 395 [SEALED] Letter to Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Warren K. Mabey regarding Deposition Testimony. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Mabey, Warren)
June 3, 2015 Filing 394 [SEALED] Letter to Chief Judge Stark from John G. Day regarding Objections to Deposition Designations for June 3, 2015 Trial Day. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Excerpts from Yang Deposition)(Day, John)
June 3, 2015 Filing 393 [SEALED] Letter to Chief Judge Stark from John G. Day regarding Fairchild's Request to Preclude New Infringement Theory for the 366 Patent. (Day, John)
June 3, 2015 CORRECTING ENTRY: Corrected document added to D.I. #391 per request of counsel. (ntl)
June 3, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark - Jury Trial held on 6/3/2015. (Court Reporter Gaffigan/Gunning.) (rpg)
June 2, 2015 Filing 392 Proposed Jury Instructions by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Power Integrations Inc. (Joint Proposed Final Jury Instructions). (Maguire, Lauren)
June 2, 2015 Filing 391 VERDICT SHEET by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Power Integrations Inc. (Joint Proposed Verdict Form). (Maguire, Lauren) (Main Document 391 replaced on 6/3/2015) (ntl).
June 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 390 ORDER regarding curative instructions given to the jury. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 6/1/15. (ntl)
June 2, 2015 Filing 389 [SEALED] Letter to Honorrable Leonard P. Stark from William J. Marsden, Jr. regarding 366 patent. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Marsden, William)
June 2, 2015 Filing 388 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from John G. Day regarding testimony of Dr. Kelley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Day, John)
June 2, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark - Jury Trial held on 6/2/2015. (Court Reporter Gaffigan/Gunning.) (rpg)
June 1, 2015 Filing 387 [SEALED] Letter to Chief Judge Stark from John G. Day regarding Fairchild's objections to Dr. Kelley's demonstratives. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Day, John)
June 1, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark - Jury Trial held on 6/1/2015. (Court Reporter Gaffigan/Gunning.) (rpg)
May 31, 2015 Filing 386 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from John G. Day regarding opposition to Power Integrations' request for curative instruction regarding Dr. Collins. (Day, John)
May 31, 2015 Filing 385 [SEALED] Letter to Honorable Leonard P. Stark from William J. Marsden, Jr. regarding Curative instruction on scope of preclusion rulings. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Marsden, William)
May 31, 2015 Filing 384 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from John G. Day regarding requesting curative instruction to address Power Integrations' attempt to inject previously undisclosed non-infringement argument into the trial. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Day, John)
May 31, 2015 Filing 383 Letter to Honorable Leonard P. Stark from William J. Marsden, Jr. regarding curative instruction regarding Collins. (Marsden, William)
May 29, 2015 Filing 382 [SEALED] Letter to Honorable Leonard P. Stark from William J. Marsden, Jr. regarding Curative Instruction on Purported Testing. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Marsden, William)
May 29, 2015 Filing 381 Letter to Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Warren K. Mabey, Jr. regarding update on disputes regarding deposition testimony for Trial Day May 29 - re #379 Letter. (Mabey, Warren)
May 29, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark - Jury Trial held on 5/29/2015. (Court Reporter Gaffigan/Gunning.) (rpg)
May 28, 2015 Filing 380 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from John G. Day regarding issues to present to the Court before trial on Friday May 29, 2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Day, John)
May 28, 2015 Filing 379 [SEALED] Letter to Honorable Leonard P. Stark from William J. Marsden, Jr. regarding status of unresolved deposition testimony for May 29 Trial day - re #370 Letter,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Marsden, William)
May 28, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark - Jury Trial held on 5/28/2015. (Court Reporter Gaffigan/Gunning.) (rpg)
May 28, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #378 Stipulation and Order Regarding the Admission of Certain Evidence. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/28/15. (ntl)
May 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 378 STIPULATION and Order Regarding Admission of Evidence by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Day, John)
May 27, 2015 Filing 377 [SEALED] Joint Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Lauren E. Maguire regarding remaining unresolved objections to testimony designations for May 28, 2015 trial day. (Attachments: #1 TAB 1, #2 TAB 2, #3 TAB 3, #4 TAB 5, #5 TAB 6, #6 TAB 7, #7 TAB 8, #8 TAB 10, #9 TAB 15, #10 TAB 13, #11 TAB 14)(Maguire, Lauren)
May 27, 2015 Filing 376 Preliminary Jury Instructions for Jury Trial beginning on 5/26/2015. (rpg)
May 27, 2015 Filing 375 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Chief Judge Leonard P. Stark from John G. Day regarding objections to Power Integrations' proposed testimony at trial concerning non-infringing alternatives that were not disclosed in Dr. Kelley's expert report. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Day, John)
May 27, 2015 Filing 374 Letter to Honorable Leonard P. Stark from William J. Marsden, Jr. regarding objection to Fairchild's Proposed instruction - re #372 Proposed Jury Instructions. (Marsden, William)
May 27, 2015 Filing 373 Letter to Chief Judge Stark from John G. Day regarding unresolved objections to opening statement slides. (Day, John)
May 27, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark - Jury Trial held on 5/27/2015. (Court Reporter Gaffigan/Gunning.) (rpg)
May 26, 2015 Filing 372 Proposed Jury Instructions by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation (Fairchild's Additional Proposed Jury Instruction to Capture the Court's May 26, 2015 Ruling in Open Court). (Day, John)
May 26, 2015 Filing 371 Joint Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Lauren E. Maguire and William J. Marsden, Jr. regarding admissibility of testimony of Mr. Tom Yang and Mr. Gary Lin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Maguire, Lauren)
May 26, 2015 Filing 370 [SEALED] Letter to Honorable Leonard P. Stark from William J. Marsden, Jr. regarding Unresolved Objections to Deposition Designations and Exhibits for the May 28 Trial Day. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Marsden, William)
May 26, 2015 Filing 369 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney D. Stuart Bartow - filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Day, John)
May 26, 2015 Filing 368 [SEALED] EXHIBIT re #366 Letter, (TAB 15) by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Day, John)
May 26, 2015 Filing 367 Voir Dire Questions. (ntl)
May 26, 2015 Filing 366 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from John G. Day regarding unresolved objections to testimony designations for May 27, 2015 trial day.. (Attachments: #1 TAB 1, #2 TAB 2, #3 TAB 3, #4 TAB 4, #5 TAB 5, #6 TAB 6, #7 TAB 7, #8 TAB 8, #9 TAB 9, #10 TAB 10, #11 TAB 11, #12 TAB 12, #13 TAB 13, #14 TAB 14)(Day, John)
May 26, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #369 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney D. Stuart Bartow filed by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/26/15. (ntl)
May 26, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark - Jury Trial held on 5/26/2015. (Court Reporter Gaffigan/Gunning.) (rpg)
May 25, 2015 Filing 365 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from John G. Day regarding unresolved objections to deposition designations and exhibits for the May 26, 2015 trial day. (Attachments: #1 TAB 1, #2 TAB 2, #3 TAB 3)(Day, John)
May 25, 2015 Filing 364 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from John G. Day regarding requesting the Court to preclude Power Integrations from offering certain arguments and testimony regarding the '366 patent at trial.". (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Day, John)
May 24, 2015 Filing 363 [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re #356 MOTION to Preclude filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Day, John)
May 23, 2015 Filing 362 [SEALED] Letter to Honorable Leonard P. Stark from William J. Marsden, Jr. regarding Response to Fairchild's Daubert Motion - re #356 MOTION to Preclude . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Marsden, William)
May 22, 2015 Filing 361 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from John G. Day regarding response to Power Integrations' May 22, 2015 request for clarification - re #360 Letter. (Day, John)
May 22, 2015 Filing 360 Letter to Honorable Leonard P. Stark from William J. Marsden, Jr. regarding inducement defense - re 359 Oral Order,,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Marsden, William)
May 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 359 ORAL ORDER: Having reviewed the letters regarding certain disputes, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: (1) Fairchild's proposal with respect to issue 1 is ADOPTED, as the Court is unpersuaded by PI's contention that the jury must learn which features are covered by PI patents, a fact that is well beyond the "critical fact" (as even PI describes) that other features are covered by some other patent; and (2) Fairchild's position with respect to issue 2 is ADOPTED, and the Court will include Fairchild's proposed preliminary jury instruction No. 9 in the preliminary instructions it reads to the jury. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, due to a scheduling conflict, the trial day will end at 3:00 p.m. on Tuesday, May 26. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/22/15. (ntl)
May 22, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #346 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties to submit joint letter to May 18, 2015 filed by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/22/15. (ntl)
May 21, 2015 Filing 358 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Chief Judge Leonard P. Stark from John G. Day regarding request for teleconference in advance of trial. (Day, John)
May 20, 2015 Filing 357 [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re #356 MOTION to Preclude filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 6/8/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Day, John)
May 20, 2015 Filing 356 MOTION to Preclude - filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Day, John)
May 19, 2015 Filing 355 Exhibit List with Power Integrations' Objections by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Day, John)
May 19, 2015 Filing 354 DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation.(Day, John)
May 19, 2015 Filing 353 Exhibit List with Fairchild's Objections by Power Integrations Inc.. (Marsden, William)
May 19, 2015 Filing 352 DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS filed by Power Integrations Inc..(Marsden, William)
May 18, 2015 Filing 351 Letter to The Honorable Chief Judge Leonard P. Stark from John G. Day and William J. Marsden, Jr. regarding joint letter requested by the Court during the Pretrial Conference to address remaining pretrial disputes. (Day, John)
May 15, 2015 Filing 350 VERDICT SHEET by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Power Integrations Inc. (Joint Proposed Verdict Form). (Day, John)
May 15, 2015 Filing 349 Proposed Jury Instructions by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Power Integrations Inc. (Joint Proposed Final Jury Instructions). (Day, John)
May 15, 2015 Filing 348 Proposed Voir Dire by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Power Integrations Inc.. (Day, John)
May 15, 2015 Filing 347 Proposed Jury Instructions by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation (Joint Proposed Preliminary Jury Instructions). (Day, John)
May 15, 2015 Filing 346 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties to submit joint letter to May 18, 2015 - filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Day, John)
May 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 345 ORAL ORDER: Having reviewed the parties' recent filings (D.I. 341-344), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Fairchild may file a Daubert motion regarding Mr. Robinson and may do so no later than May 20. Should Fairchild file such a motion, it may support that motion with a letter brief, not to exceed four (4) pages, due at the same time. Power may respond, with a letter brief not to exceed four (4) pages, due Saturday, May 23. Fairchild may file a letter reply brief, not to exceed two (2) pages, due Sunday, May 24. The parties should be prepared to address the motion on the morning of the start of trial. Fairchild's motion to expedite briefing (D.I. 341) is DENIED AS MOOT. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/14/15. (ntl)
May 14, 2015 Filing 344 REPLY BRIEF re #341 MOTION to Expedite Briefing on Fairchild's Renewed Daubert Motion filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Day, John)
May 14, 2015 Filing 343 RESPONSE to Motion re #341 MOTION to Expedite Briefing on Fairchild's Renewed Daubert Motion filed by Power Integrations Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D)(Marsden, William)
May 13, 2015 Filing 342 PROPOSED ORDER to Expedite Briefing re #341 MOTION to Expedite Briefing on Fairchild's Renewed Daubert Motion by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Day, John)
May 13, 2015 Filing 341 MOTION to Expedite Briefing on Fairchild's Renewed Daubert Motion - filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Day, John)
May 12, 2015 Filing 340 Official Transcript of Pretrial Conference held on April 24, 2015 before Chief Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/2/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/12/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/10/2015. (bpg)
May 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 339 ORDER re #338 Memorandum Opinion -- #196 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Power Integrations Inc. is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part as moot; #193 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/4/15. (ntl)
May 4, 2015 Filing 338 MEMORANDUM OPINION re #193 & #196 motions for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/4/15. (ntl)
May 4, 2015 Filing 337 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from William J. Marsden, Jr. regarding the Court's inquiry to streamline trial issues - re #194 Opening Brief in Support, #193 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Marsden, William)
May 4, 2015 CORRECTING ENTRY: D.I. #338 deleted per counsel's request on 5/4/2015. (rpg)
April 24, 2015 Filing 336 STATEMENT (Fairchild's Notice Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. 282) by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Mayo, Andrew)
April 24, 2015 Filing 335 REDACTED VERSION of #299 MOTION for Reargument by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Mayo, Andrew)
April 24, 2015 Filing 334 REDACTED VERSION of #300 MOTION to Expedite by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Mayo, Andrew)
April 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 333 ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Court GRANTS the parties' joint request to supply potential jurors with a juror questionnaire, provided that the parties confer with the Court's jury administrator about the details for providing such a document to potential jurors, including the time by which it must be done. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/24/15. (ntl)
April 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 332 MEMORANDUM ORDER re #299 MOTION for Reargument filed by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation is DENIED; Fairchild's Objections to Special Master Orders are OVERRULED and the Special Master's Orders are ADOPTED. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/24/15. (ntl)
April 24, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #324 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Yar R. Chaikovsky filed by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/24/15. (ntl)
April 24, 2015 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Yar R. Chaikovsky for Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (dmp, )
April 24, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark - Final Pretrial Conference held on 4/24/2015. (Court Reporter B. Gaffigan.) (ntl)
April 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 331 MEMORANDUM ORDER re motions in limine and disputed provisions in the pretrial order. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/23/15. (ntl)
April 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 330 ORDER re #329 Memorandum Opinion -- #193 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/23/15. (ntl)
April 23, 2015 Filing 329 MEMORANDUM OPINION re #193 motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/23/15. (ntl)
April 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 328 ORDER re #327 Memorandum Opinion -- #190 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings or, in the Alternative, Motion for Partial Summary Judgment that Preclusion Law Bars PI from Re-Litigating the Validity and Direct Infringement of Claims 6, 7, 18 and 19 of U.S. Patent No. 7,259,972 filed by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/23/15. (ntl)
April 23, 2015 Filing 327 MEMORANDUM OPINION re #190 motion for judgment on the pleadings. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/23/15. (ntl)
April 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 326 ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the pretrial conference tomorrow, April 24, will begin at 1:00 p.m. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/23/15. (ntl)
April 23, 2015 Filing 325 [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #299 MOTION for Reargument filed by Power Integrations Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 5/4/2015. (Marsden, William)
April 23, 2015 Filing 324 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Yar R. Chaikovsky - filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Mayo, Andrew)
April 21, 2015 Filing 323 VERDICT SHEET by Power Integrations Inc. (Proposed). (Marsden, William)
April 21, 2015 Filing 322 VERDICT SHEET by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation . (Maguire, Lauren)
April 21, 2015 Filing 321 Proposed Voir Dire by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Maguire, Lauren)
April 21, 2015 Filing 320 Proposed Jury Instructions by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation (Final). (Maguire, Lauren)
April 21, 2015 Filing 319 Proposed Jury Instructions by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation (Preliminary). (Maguire, Lauren)
April 21, 2015 Filing 318 Proposed Voir Dire by Power Integrations Inc.. (Marsden, William)
April 21, 2015 Filing 317 Proposed Jury Instructions by Power Integrations Inc. Power Integrations Proposed Preliminary Jury Instructions. (Marsden, William)
April 21, 2015 Filing 316 Proposed Jury Instructions by Power Integrations Inc. Power Integrations' Proposed Final Jury Instructions. (Marsden, William)
April 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 315 ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Fairchild's motion to expedite (D.I. 300) is GRANTED. Power Integrations shall submit its answering brief regarding Fairchild's motion for reargument by Thursday, April 23, 2015. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/21/15. (ntl)
April 20, 2015 Filing 314 Joint Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from John G. Day and William J. Marsden, Jr. regarding joint status report on preclusion per Court's April 15, 2015 Memorandum Order - re #296 Order. (Day, John)
April 20, 2015 Filing 313 [SEALED] Supplemental APPENDIX re #312 Appendix, #311 Response to Objections (Volume II) by Power Integrations Inc.. (Attachments: #1 A1625-A1924, #2 A1925-2273, #3 A2274-A2299, #4 A2300-A2321)(Marsden, William)
April 20, 2015 Filing 312 [SEALED] Supplemental APPENDIX re #311 Response to Objections (Volume I) by Power Integrations Inc.. (Attachments: #1 A822-834, #2 A835-A1002, #3 A1003-1016, #4 A1017-1316, #5 A1317-1624)(Marsden, William)
April 20, 2015 Filing 311 [SEALED] RESPONSE TO OBJECTIONS by Power Integrations Inc. re #286 Objections to the Special Master's Order regarding Power Integrations' Motion to Strike. (Marsden, William)
April 20, 2015 Filing 310 REDACTED VERSION of #290 Appendix Volume II of II by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Mayo, Andrew)
April 20, 2015 Filing 309 REDACTED VERSION of #289 Appendix Volume I of II by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Mayo, Andrew)
April 20, 2015 Filing 308 REDACTED VERSION of #286 Objections to the Special Master's Order Regarding Defendant's Motion to Strike by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mayo, Andrew)
April 20, 2015 Filing 307 REDACTED VERSION of #288 Appendix by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Mayo, Andrew)
April 20, 2015 Filing 306 REDACTED VERSION of #287 Objections to the Special Master's Order Regarding Fairchild's Motion to Strike by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mayo, Andrew)
April 20, 2015 Filing 305 [SEALED] RESPONSE TO OBJECTIONS by Power Integrations Inc. re #287 Objections to Special Master Order No. 6 Regarding Fairchild's Motion to Strike. (Marsden, William)
April 20, 2015 Filing 304 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Limin Zheng, Neil Warren and James Huguenin-Love - filed by Power Integrations Inc.. (Marsden, William)
April 20, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #304 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Limin Zheng, Neil Warren and James Huguenin-Love filed by Power Integrations Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/20/15. (ntl)
April 20, 2015 Remark: Memorandum Opinion at D.I. #295 has been unsealed. (ntl)
April 17, 2015 Filing 303 [SEALED] Proposed Pretrial Order by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Power Integrations Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2A, #3 Exhibit 2B, #4 Exhibit 3A, #5 Exhibit 3B, #6 Exhibit 4A, #7 Exhibit 4B, #8 Exhibit 5A, #9 Exhibit 5B, #10 Exhibit 6A, #11 Exhibit 6B, #12 Exhibit 6C, #13 Exhibit 7A, #14 Exhibit 7B, #15 Exhibit 7C)(Maguire, Lauren)
April 17, 2015 Filing 302 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from John G. Day regarding sealed memorandum opinion - re #295 Memorandum Opinion. (Day, John)
April 17, 2015 Filing 301 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #300 MOTION to Expedite filed by Power Integrations Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 4/27/2015. (Marsden, William)
April 17, 2015 Filing 300 [SEALED] MOTION to Expedite - filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Maguire, Lauren)
April 17, 2015 Filing 299 [SEALED] MOTION for Reargument - filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Maguire, Lauren)
April 15, 2015 Filing 298 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Supplemental Affirmative Expert Report of James E. Malackowski filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation.(Mayo, Andrew)
April 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 297 ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the teleconference scheduled for April 15 at 4:00 is CANCELLED; Counsel may file the joint status report by Monday, April 20. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/15/15. (ntl)
April 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 296 ORDER re #295 Memorandum Opinion re pending motions. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/15/15. (ntl)
April 15, 2015 Filing 295 MEMORANDUM OPINION re pending motions. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/15/15. This opinion has been emailed to local counsel. (ntl) (Main Document 295 unsealed on 4/20/2015) (ntl). Modified on 4/20/2015 (ntl).
April 14, 2015 Filing 294 Official Transcript of Telephone Conference held on March 23, 2015 before Special Master Allen M. Terrell, Jr. Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/5/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/15/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/13/2015. (bpg)
April 14, 2015 Filing 293 Official Transcript of Telephone Conference held on March 17, 2015 before Special Master Allen M. Terrell, Jr. Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/5/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/15/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/13/2015. (bpg)
April 14, 2015 Filing 292 Official Transcript of Oral Argument Hearing held on March 3, 2015 before Chief Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/5/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/15/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/13/2015. (bpg)
April 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 291 ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Court will hold a status teleconference tomorrow, April 15, beginning at 4:00 p.m. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/14/15. (ntl)
April 13, 2015 Filing 290 [SEALED] APPENDIX re #286 Objections (Volume II of II) by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Mayo, Andrew)
April 13, 2015 Filing 289 [SEALED] APPENDIX re #286 Objections (Volume I of II) by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Part 1 of 2, #2 Exhibit Part 2 of 2)(Mayo, Andrew)
April 13, 2015 Filing 288 [SEALED] APPENDIX re #287 Objections by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Mayo, Andrew)
April 13, 2015 Filing 287 [SEALED] OBJECTIONS by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation (Objections to Special Master's Order Regarding Fairchild's Motion to Strike). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mayo, Andrew)
April 13, 2015 Filing 286 [SEALED] OBJECTIONS by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation (Objections to Special Master's Order Regarding Defendant's Motion to Strike). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mayo, Andrew)
April 10, 2015 Filing 285 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from John G. Day regarding response to Power Integration's April 10, 2015 letter - re #284 Letter. (Day, John)
April 10, 2015 Filing 284 Letter to The Honorable Chief Judge Leonard P. Stark from William J. Marsden, Jr. regarding the parties' pretrial order submissions and the upcoming pretrial conference - re #283 Letter. (Marsden, William)
April 9, 2015 Filing 283 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from John G. Day regarding Fairchild's request for emergency status call in connection with the pretrial order. (Day, John)
April 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 282 SO ORDERED re proposal set forth in the joint status report (D.I. 278) regarding written objections to the Special Master Orders. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/8/15. (ntl)
April 8, 2015 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Robert J Walters for Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mas, )
April 7, 2015 Filing 281 SPECIAL MASTER ORDER NO. 7. Signed by Special Master Allen M. Terrell, Jr. on 4/7/15. (ntl)
April 7, 2015 Filing 280 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Alexander P. Ott as co-counsel.. (Maguire, Lauren)
April 7, 2015 Filing 279 NOTICE of Change of Firm Affiliation by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation (Maguire, Lauren)
April 7, 2015 Address updated per: (829 in 1:08-cv-00309-LPS) Notice (Other), (277 in 1:12-cv-00540-LPS) Notice (Other), (915 in 1:04-cv-01371-LPS) Notice (Other) For e-noticing purposes, E-mail address of Pro Hac Vice admitted attorney Patrick J. Stafford updated. Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01371-LPS, 1:08-cv-00309-LPS, 1:12-cv-00540-LPS(rbe) E-mail address corrected on 4/10/2015 (rbe).
April 6, 2015 Filing 278 Joint STATUS REPORT by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Maguire, Lauren)
April 6, 2015 Filing 277 NOTICE of Change of Firm Affiliation by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation (Mayo, Andrew)
April 6, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #275 Stipulated Order Amending Protective Order filed by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/6/15. (ntl)
April 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 276 ORAL ORDER: In light of the recent filing of several Special Master Orders (see, e.g., D.I. 269, 270, 274), and in light of the impending pre-trial conference set for April 24, 2015, and given the pendency of several motions that may to some extent be related to the Special Master Orders (see, e.g., D.I. 271), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall file, no later than April 6, a joint status report indicating whether they intend to file objections to any of the Special Master Orders and, if so, how they propose to brief those objections in a manner that will permit the Court to resolve the objections without affecting the remainder of the case schedule. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/2/15. (ntl)
March 31, 2015 Filing 275 STIPULATION Amending Protective Order by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Day, John)
March 31, 2015 Filing 274 SPECIAL MASTER ORDER NO. 6 Regarding Fairchild's Motion to Strike #258 . Signed by Special Master Allen M. Terrell, Jr. on 3/31/15. (ntl)
March 30, 2015 Filing 273 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Roozbeh Gorgin and Leigh J. Martinson as co-counsel.. (Day, John)
March 30, 2015 Filing 272 NOTICE of Change of Firm Affiliation by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation (Day, John)
March 27, 2015 Filing 271 Letter to Honorable Leonard P. Stark from William J. Marsden, Jr. regarding Special Master Terrell ruling and pending motions for summary judgment. (Marsden, William)
March 26, 2015 Filing 270 SPECIAL MASTER ORDER NO. 5 AS TO IMPLEMENTING ORDER NO. 4. Signed by Special Master Allen M. Terrell, Jr. on 3/26/15. (ntl)
March 26, 2015 Filing 269 SPECIAL MASTER ORDER NO. 4 REGARDING POWER INTEGRATIONS' MOTION TO STRIKE. Signed by Special Master Allen M. Terrell, Jr. on 3/26/15. (ntl)
March 25, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #268 Stipulation and Order regarding schedule for revised supplemental expert reports. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/25/15. (ntl)
March 24, 2015 Filing 268 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Regarding Schedule for Revised Supplemental Expert Reports by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Day, John)
March 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ORDER re #266 Memorandum Opinion -- #196 Daubert Motion on Fairchild's Claim for Damages for Alleged Inducement With Respect to the '972 patent filed by Power Integrations Inc. is GRANTED; #198 MOTION to Preclude filed by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/20/15. (ntl)
March 20, 2015 Filing 266 MEMORANDUM OPINION re motions to preclude. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/20/15. (ntl)
March 19, 2015 Filing 265 REDACTED VERSION of #261 Letter by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 9)(Day, John)
March 17, 2015 Filing 264 REDACTED VERSION of #260 Letter, to Honorable Leonard P. Stark from William J. Marsden, Jr. by Power Integrations Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C-E)(Marsden, William)
March 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 263 ORAL ORDER: Having reviewed the letter briefing relating to Fairchild's motion to strike (D.I. 258), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Fairchild's motion is REFERRED to Special Master Allen Terrell. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all future motions to strike, if any, are REFERRED to Special Master Terrell. Additionally, to accommodate the parties' scheduling conflict, the Pre-Trial Conference is rescheduled to begin at 2:30pm on April 24, 2015. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/13/15. (ntl)
March 12, 2015 Filing 262 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from John G. Day regarding request for a teleconference on motion to strike - re #258 MOTION to Strike #255 Letter, (Fairchild's Motion to Strike Untimely Contentions in Power Integrations' Expert Report, Fairchild's supporting letter is D.I. 255). (Day, John)
March 12, 2015 Filing 261 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from John G. Day regarding Fairchild's reply in support of its motion to strike. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-9)(Day, John)
March 9, 2015 Filing 260 [SEALED] Letter to Honorable Leonard P. Stark from William J. Marsden, Jr. regarding in Response to Fairchild's Motion to Strike - re #255 Letter,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Marsden, William)
March 9, 2015 Filing 259 REDACTED VERSION of #255 Letter, by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 10)(Mayo, Andrew)
March 6, 2015 Filing 258 MOTION to Strike #255 Letter, (Fairchild's Motion to Strike Untimely Contentions in Power Integrations' Expert Report, Fairchild's supporting letter is D.I. 255) - filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Day, John)
March 4, 2015 Filing 257 Official Transcript of Telephone Conference held on February 26, 2015 before Special Master Allen Terrell. Court Reporter Ellie Corbett Hannum, Telephone (302) 571-0510. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/25/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/6/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/2/2015. (bpg)
March 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 256 ORAL ORDER: Having been advised by the parties that the pending motion to amend is moot, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion (D.I. 121) is DENIED AS MOOT. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/4/15. (ntl)
March 3, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark - Oral Argument held on 3/3/15 (Court Reporter B. Gaffigan). (ntl)
March 2, 2015 Filing 255 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from John G. Day regarding Fairchild's Motion to Strike Untimely Contentions in Power Integrations' Expert Report. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7 (Part I), #8 Exhibit 7 (Part II), #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10)(Day, John)
March 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 254 ORAL ORDER: Regarding the hearing on March 3, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that each side will have up to two (2) hours for argument. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/2/15. (ntl)
February 27, 2015 Filing 253 SPECIAL MASTER ORDER NO. 3 Relating to Implementation of the Court's Orders. Signed by Special Master Allen M. Terrell, Jr. on 2/27/15. (ntl)
February 24, 2015 Filing 252 REDACTED VERSION of #242 Reply Brief In Support of its Motion to Sever and Stay Fairchild's Claim regarding the 972 Patent by Power Integrations Inc.. (Marsden, William)
February 24, 2015 Filing 251 Special Master Order No. 2 Relating to Discovery Dispute Procedures. Signed by Special Master Allen M. Terrell, Jr. on 2/24/15. (ntl)
February 20, 2015 Filing 250 REDACTED VERSION of #234 Declaration of William J. Marsden, Jr. by Power Integrations Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 39-43)(Marsden, William)
February 20, 2015 Filing 249 REDACTED VERSION of #233 Reply Brief, In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment and Daubert Motion on Fairchild's Claim for Damages for Alleged Inducement With Respect to the '972 patent by Power Integrations Inc.. (Marsden, William)
February 20, 2015 Filing 248 REDACTED VERSION of #239 Declaration by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit H-I)(Maguire, Lauren)
February 20, 2015 Filing 247 REDACTED VERSION of #238 Reply Brief by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Maguire, Lauren)
February 20, 2015 Filing 246 REDACTED VERSION of #236 Reply Brief by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Maguire, Lauren)
February 17, 2015 Filing 245 REDACTED VERSION of #227 Declaration of William J. Marsden. Jr. by Power Integrations Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-8)(Marsden, William)
February 17, 2015 Filing 244 REDACTED VERSION of #226 Answering Brief in Opposition to Fairchild's Motion for Summary Judgment by Power Integrations Inc.. (Marsden, William)
February 17, 2015 Filing 243 DECLARATION re #242 Reply Brief of William J. Marsden, Jr. by Power Integrations Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit G)(Marsden, William)
February 17, 2015 Filing 242 [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re #187 MOTION to Sever and Stay Fairchild's Claim Regarding the '972 Patent filed by Power Integrations Inc.. (Marsden, William)
February 17, 2015 Filing 241 REDACTED VERSION of #228 Answering Brief in Opposition Fairchild Daubert Motion by Power Integrations Inc.. (Marsden, William)
February 17, 2015 Filing 240 REDACTED VERSION of #220 Answering Brief in Opposition, FCS Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, or in Alternative, Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Preclusion of 972 by Power Integrations Inc.. (Marsden, William)
February 13, 2015 Filing 239 [SEALED] Supplemental DECLARATION re #238 Reply Brief (Declaration of Christina A. Ondrick) by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit H, #2 Exhibit I)(Day, John)
February 13, 2015 Filing 238 [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re #198 MOTION to Preclude filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Day, John)
February 13, 2015 Filing 237 Supplemental DECLARATION re #236 Reply Brief (Declaration of Christina A. Ondrick) by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit CC, #2 Exhibit DD)(Day, John)
February 13, 2015 Filing 236 [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re #193 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Day, John)
February 13, 2015 Filing 235 REPLY BRIEF re #190 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings or, in the Alternative, Motion for Partial Summary Judgment that Preclusion Law Bars PI from Re-Litigating the Validity and Direct Infringement of Claims 6, 7, 18 and 19 of U.S. Patent No. 7,259,972 filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Day, John)
February 13, 2015 Filing 234 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #233 Reply Brief, of William J. Marsden, Jr. by Power Integrations Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 39-43)(Marsden, William)
February 13, 2015 Filing 233 [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re #196 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Daubert Motion on Fairchild's Claim for Damages for Alleged Inducement With Respect to the '972 patent filed by Power Integrations Inc.. (Marsden, William)
February 13, 2015 Filing 232 REDACTED VERSION of #223 Declaration of Christina A. Ondrick by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-H)(Maguire, Lauren)
February 13, 2015 Filing 231 REDACTED VERSION of #225 Declaration of Christina A. Ondrick by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-G)(Maguire, Lauren)
February 13, 2015 Filing 230 REDACTED VERSION of #224 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Maguire, Lauren)
February 6, 2015 Filing 229 DECLARATION re #228 Answering Brief in Opposition of William J. Marsden, Jr. In Support of Power Integrations' Opposition to Fairchild's Daubert Motions by Power Integrations Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-3)(Marsden, William)
February 6, 2015 Filing 228 [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #198 MOTION to Preclude filed by Power Integrations Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 2/17/2015. (Marsden, William)
February 6, 2015 Filing 227 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #226 Answering Brief in Opposition of William J. Marsden, Jr. by Power Integrations Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-8)(Marsden, William)
February 6, 2015 Filing 226 [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #193 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Power Integrations Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 2/17/2015. (Marsden, William)
February 6, 2015 Filing 225 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #224 Answering Brief in Opposition, (Declaration of Christina A. Ondrick) by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-G)(Day, John)
February 6, 2015 Filing 224 [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #196 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Daubert Motion on Fairchild's Claim for Damages for Alleged Inducement With Respect to the '972 patent filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 2/17/2015. (Day, John)
February 6, 2015 Filing 223 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #222 Answering Brief in Opposition, (Declaration of Christina A. Ondrick) by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-H)(Day, John)
February 6, 2015 Filing 222 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #187 MOTION to Sever and Stay Fairchild's Claim Regarding the '972 Patent filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 2/17/2015. (Day, John)
February 6, 2015 Filing 221 DECLARATION re #220 Answering Brief in Opposition, of William J. Marsden, Jr. In Opposition to Fairchild's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, or In the Alternative, Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Preclusion of the '972 Patent by Power Integrations Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-2)(Marsden, William)
February 6, 2015 Filing 220 [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #190 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings or, in the Alternative, Motion for Partial Summary Judgment that Preclusion Law Bars PI from Re-Litigating the Validity and Direct Infringement of Claims 6, 7, 18 and 19 of U.S. Patent No. 7,259,972, #198 MOTION to Preclude filed by Power Integrations Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 2/17/2015. (Marsden, William)
February 2, 2015 Filing 219 Special Master Order No. 1 Relating to Discovery Dispute Procedures. Signed by Special Master Allen M. Terrell, Jr. on 2/2/15. (ntl)
January 30, 2015 Filing 218 REDACTED VERSION of #202 Declaration,,, William J. Marsden, Jr. In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment and Daubert Motion by Power Integrations Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-20, #2 Exhibit 21-38)(Marsden, William)
January 30, 2015 Filing 217 REDACTED VERSION of #197 Opening Brief in Support, in Support of its Motions for Summary Judgment and Daubert Motion by Power Integrations Inc.. (Marsden, William)
January 30, 2015 Filing 216 REDACTED VERSION of #189 Declaration, of William J. Marsden, Jr. by Power Integrations Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-F)(Marsden, William)
January 30, 2015 Filing 215 REDACTED VERSION of #188 Opening Brief in Support, by Power Integrations Inc.. (Marsden, William)
January 30, 2015 Filing 214 REDACTED VERSION of #201 Declaration of Robert J. Walters by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Maguire, Lauren)
January 30, 2015 Filing 213 REDACTED VERSION of #200 Declaration, of Christina A. Ondrick by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B - G)(Maguire, Lauren)
January 30, 2015 Filing 212 REDACTED VERSION of #199 Opening Brief in Support by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Maguire, Lauren)
January 30, 2015 Filing 211 REDACTED VERSION of #204 Declaration, of Christina A. Ondrick (Volume III of III) by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit U - W, #2 Exhibit X, #3 Exhibit Y - AA, #4 Exhibit BB)(Maguire, Lauren)
January 30, 2015 Filing 210 REDACTED VERSION of #203 Declaration, of Christina A. Ondrick (Volume II of III) by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit G - J, #2 Exhibit K, #3 Exhibit L, #4 Exhibit M, #5 Exhibit N part 1, #6 Exhibit N part 2, #7 Exhibit O - Q, #8 Exhibit R, #9 Exhibit S, #10 Exhibit T)(Maguire, Lauren)
January 30, 2015 Filing 209 REDACTED VERSION of #195 Declaration, of Christina A. Ondrick (Volume I of III) by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - C, #2 Exhibit D, #3 Exhibit E - F)(Maguire, Lauren)
January 30, 2015 Filing 208 REDACTED VERSION of #194 Opening Brief in Support by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Maguire, Lauren)
January 30, 2015 Filing 207 REDACTED VERSION of #192 Declaration, of Christina A. Ondrick by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - F, #2 Exhibit G part 1, #3 Exhibit G part 2, #4 Exhibit G part 3)(Maguire, Lauren)
January 30, 2015 Filing 206 REDACTED VERSION of #191 Opening Brief in Support, by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Maguire, Lauren)
January 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER appointing Special Master: Allen M. Terrell, Jr. appointed. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/30/15. (ntl)
January 23, 2015 Filing 204 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #195 Declaration, #203 Declaration, of Christina A. Ondrick (Volume III) by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 U, #2 V part 1, #3 V part 2, #4 W, #5 X, #6 Y, #7 Z, #8 AA part 1, #9 AA part 2, #10 AA part 3, #11 AA part 4, #12 BB)(Day, John)
January 23, 2015 Filing 203 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #195 Declaration, of Christina A. Ondrick (Volume II) by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 G, #2 H, #3 I, #4 J, #5 K, #6 L, #7 M, #8 N part 1, #9 N part 2, #10 O, #11 P, #12 Q, #13 R, #14 S, #15 T)(Day, John)
January 23, 2015 Filing 202 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #196 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Daubert Motion on Fairchild's Claim for Damages for Alleged Inducement With Respect to the '972 patent of William J. Marsden, Jr. by Power Integrations Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38)(Marsden, William)
January 23, 2015 Filing 201 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #199 Opening Brief in Support (Declaration of Robert J. Walters) by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Day, John)
January 23, 2015 Filing 200 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #199 Opening Brief in Support (Declaration of Christina Ondrick) by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Day, John)
January 23, 2015 Filing 199 [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re #198 MOTION to Preclude filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 2/9/2015. (Day, John)
January 23, 2015 Filing 198 MOTION to Preclude - filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Day, John)
January 23, 2015 Filing 197 [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re #196 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Daubert Motion on Fairchild's Claim for Damages for Alleged Inducement With Respect to the '972 patent filed by Power Integrations Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 2/9/2015. (Marsden, William)
January 23, 2015 Filing 196 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Daubert Motion on Fairchild's Claim for Damages for Alleged Inducement With Respect to the '972 patent - filed by Power Integrations Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Marsden, William)
January 23, 2015 Filing 195 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #194 Opening Brief in Support (Declaration of Christina Ondrick) (Volume I) by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Day, John)
January 23, 2015 Filing 194 [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re #193 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 2/9/2015. (Day, John)
January 23, 2015 Filing 193 MOTION for Summary Judgment - filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Day, John)
January 23, 2015 Filing 192 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #191 Opening Brief in Support, (Declaration of Christina A. Ondrick) by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G (Part 1), #8 Exhibit G (Part 2), #9 Exhibit G (Part 3))(Maguire, Lauren)
January 23, 2015 Filing 191 [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re #190 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings or, in the Alternative, Motion for Partial Summary Judgment that Preclusion Law Bars PI from Re-Litigating the Validity and Direct Infringement of Claims 6, 7, 18 and 19 of U.S. Patent No. 7,259,972 filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 2/9/2015. (Maguire, Lauren)
January 23, 2015 Filing 190 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings or, in the Alternative, Motion for Partial Summary Judgment that Preclusion Law Bars PI from Re-Litigating the Validity and Direct Infringement of Claims 6, 7, 18 and 19 of U.S. Patent No. 7,259,972 - filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Maguire, Lauren)
January 23, 2015 Filing 189 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #188 Opening Brief in Support, of William J. Marsden, Jr. by Power Integrations Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Marsden, William)
January 23, 2015 Filing 188 [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re #187 MOTION to Sever and Stay Fairchild's Claim Regarding the '972 Patent filed by Power Integrations Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 2/9/2015. (Marsden, William)
January 23, 2015 Filing 187 MOTION to Sever and Stay Fairchild's Claim Regarding the '972 Patent - filed by Power Integrations Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Marsden, William)
January 20, 2015 Filing 186 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from John G. Day regarding the Court's January 13, 2015 Oral Order (D.I. 183). (Day, John)
January 20, 2015 Filing 185 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from John G. Day regarding Joint Request for Appointment of a Special Master. (Day, John)
January 16, 2015 Filing 184 Letter to The Honorable Chief Judge Leonard P. Stark regarding Joint Response of the Parties to the Court's January 13, 2015 Oral Order. (Day, John)
January 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORAL ORDER: IT HEREBY ORDERED that PI's motion to strike Fairchild's reliance on untimely contentions (D.I. 171) is GRANTED. The Court agrees with PI (see D.I. 168) that this issue was already decided when the Court evaluated the parties' dispute over Fairchild's contentions (see D.I. 162). At that time the Court gave both sides fair warning that it would adopt whichever side's position was the more reasonable as a whole. Fairchild understood (or at minimum should have understood) what was at stake at that time yet continued to request that nothing be stricken, a position the Court found to be less reasonable than PI's position. Fairchild's interpretation of the Court's prior order is unconvincing, for reasons including that the analysis of the Pennypack factors contained in the prior order plainly contemplated that the untimely contentions were no longer to be asserted in this proceeding in any form. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that PI's request to sanction Fairchild and its counsel (D.I. 168 at 3) is DENIED as unwarranted under the totality of the circumstances. Finally, the parties SHALL, no later than January 16, submit a proposed form of order implementing the Court's ruling on the motion to strike, with the level of detail provided in PI's previously-proposed form of order (D.I. 169). Any disputes as to the details of the form of order, or any further discovery-related disputes in this matter, will be referred to a special master. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/13/15. (ntl)
January 5, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #182 Stipulation and Order regarding schedule for dispositive/Daubert briefing filed by Power Integrations Inc. -- Dispositive Motions due by 1/23/2015. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/5/15. (ntl)
December 24, 2014 Filing 182 STIPULATION Regarding Schedule for Dispositive/Daubert Briefing re #163 Stipulation by Power Integrations Inc.. (Marsden, William)
December 22, 2014 Filing 181 REDACTED VERSION of #174 Reply Brief, by Power Integrations Inc.. (Marsden, William)
December 19, 2014 Filing 180 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Third Supplemental Initial Disclosures filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation.(Day, John)
December 18, 2014 Filing 179 Letter to The Honorable Chief Judge Leonard P. Stark from John G. Day regarding Fairchild's reply to Power's December 17th letter - re #178 Letter. (Day, John)
December 17, 2014 Filing 178 Letter to Honorable Leonard P. Stark from William J. Marsden, Jr. regarding response to Fairchild letter re in-person hearing on renewed Motion to Strike - re #176 Letter, #175 Letter,. (Marsden, William)
December 17, 2014 Filing 177 REDACTED VERSION of #173 Letter,, by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 11)(Maguire, Lauren)
December 17, 2014 Filing 176 Letter to The Honorable Chief Judge Leonard P. Stark from John G. Day regarding Fairchild's request for an in-person hearing on Power Integration's motion to strike expert report and exclude expert testimony. (Day, John)
December 15, 2014 Filing 175 Joint Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from William J. Marsden, Jr. regarding requesting teleconference to address Power Integrations' Motion to Strike - re #171 MOTION to Strike #168 Letter, MOTION TO STRIKE FAIRCHILD'S CONTINUED RELIANCE ON UNTIMELY CONTENTIONS AND MATERIALS AND TO ENFORCE THE COURT'S PRIOR ORDER GRANTING POWER INTEGRATIONS' PRIOR MOTION TO STRIKE. (Marsden, William)
December 15, 2014 Filing 174 [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re #171 MOTION to Strike #168 Letter, MOTION TO STRIKE FAIRCHILD'S CONTINUED RELIANCE ON UNTIMELY CONTENTIONS AND MATERIALS AND TO ENFORCE THE COURT'S PRIOR ORDER GRANTING POWER INTEGRATIONS' PRIOR MOTION TO STRIKE filed by Power Integrations Inc.. (Marsden, William)
December 10, 2014 Filing 173 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from John G. Day regarding response to Power Integration's Motion to Strike - re #171 MOTION to Strike #168 Letter, MOTION TO STRIKE FAIRCHILD'S CONTINUED RELIANCE ON UNTIMELY CONTENTIONS AND MATERIALS AND TO ENFORCE THE COURT'S PRIOR ORDER GRANTING POWER INTEGRATIONS' PRIOR MOTION TO STRIKE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Part 1), #2 Exhibit 1 (Part 2), #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3 (Part 1), #5 Exhibit 3 (Part 2), #6 Exhibit 4 - 11)(Day, John)
December 10, 2014 Filing 172 REDACTED VERSION of #168 Letter, to Honoarble Leonard P. Stark from William J. Marsden, Jr. by Power Integrations Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 18-26)(Marsden, William)
December 3, 2014 Filing 171 MOTION to Strike #168 Letter, MOTION TO STRIKE FAIRCHILD'S CONTINUED RELIANCE ON UNTIMELY CONTENTIONS AND MATERIALS AND TO ENFORCE THE COURT'S PRIOR ORDER GRANTING POWER INTEGRATIONS' PRIOR MOTION TO STRIKE - filed by Power Integrations Inc.. (Marsden, William)
December 3, 2014 Filing 170 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from John G. Day regarding response to Power Integrations' Letter/Motion to Preclude Expert Testimony - re #168 Letter,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Day, John)
December 2, 2014 Filing 169 PROPOSED ORDER to Enforce Court's Prior Order re #168 Letter, by Power Integrations Inc.. (Marsden, William)
December 2, 2014 Filing 168 [SEALED] Letter to Honorable Leonard P. Stark from William J. Marsden, Jr. regarding requesting enforcement of Court's prior Order (D.I. 162) - re 162 Oral Order,,,,,,,,,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 18, #2 Exhibit 19, #3 Exhibit 20, #4 Exhibit 21, #5 Exhibit 22, #6 Exhibit 23, #7 Exhibit 24, #8 Exhibit 25, #9 Exhibit 26)(Marsden, William)
November 25, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #166 MOTION to Amend Case Caption pursuant to Name Change (Unopposed) -- Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation added. System General Corporation terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 11/25/14. (ntl)
November 24, 2014 Filing 167 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Terrence P. McMahon and Jeremiah A. Armstrong as co-counsel.. (Mayo, Andrew)
November 24, 2014 Filing 166 MOTION to Amend Case Caption pursuant to Name Change (Unopposed) - filed by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, System General Corporation. (Mayo, Andrew)
November 12, 2014 Filing 165 NOTICE OF SERVICE of the Revised Opening Expert Report of Gu-Yeon Wei Regarding U.S. Patent Nos. 6,229,366, 7,876,587, 7,952,895, 7,995,359, and 8,115,457 and the Revised Opening Expert Report of Dr. Edward R. Collins, Jr. Regarding Infringement of U.S. Patent Nos. 7,286,123, 7,525,259, and 7,259,972 filed by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, System General Corporation.(Mayo, Andrew)
November 3, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #163 Stipulation and Order regarding schedule for expert reports, dispositive/Daubert motions, and trial filed by System General Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation -- Dispositive Motions due by 1/5/2015. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 11/3/14. (ntl)
October 31, 2014 Filing 164 Official Transcript of Telephone Conference held on October 3, 2014 before Chief Judge Leonard A. Stark. Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/21/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/1/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/29/2015. (bpg)
October 27, 2014 Filing 163 Joint STIPULATION and Proposed Order regarding Scheduling for Expert Reports, Dispositive / Daubert Motions, and Trial by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, System General Corporation. (Mayo, Andrew)
October 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORAL ORDER: Having reviewed the parties' most recent letters regarding Fairchild's contentions in this matter, as well as the related filings, and having heard oral argument on the issue on October 3, 2014, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, in light of all the facts and circumstances, for the reasons stated below as well as those stated during the recent teleconference, Defendant Power Integrations' ("Power") position is more reasonable than Plaintiff Fairchild's. For example, Fairchild provides no persuasive reason for changing its identification of certain structures in its May 2014 infringement contentions, or for citing new prior art in its supplemental invalidity contentions well after the close of fact discovery in December 2013. Moreover, Fairchild cannot avoid the boundaries of its timely infringement contentions by not disclosing the substance of its doctrine of equivalents and structural equivalents contentions until its Corrected Opening Expert Report of Dr. Collins in September 2014. This conclusion is supported by application of the Pennypack factors, as: Power would be prejudiced by allowing Fairchild to proceed on its untimely contentions, which would likely lead to loss of the current trial date and the necessity for additional expensive discovery, and could potentially require additional claim construction proceedings; Power could not cure the prejudice without undue expense and/or delay, including disruption of the currently-scheduled May/June 2015 trial; while the Court does not find Fairchild acted in bad faith, it did willfully proceed on timing in conflict with the Court's scheduling order for fact discovery, and there was no express agreement from Power to allow Fairchild to so proceed; and while Fairchild will lose some "critical" evidence, it may proceed on its timely-filed contentions. Accordingly, having previously advised the parties that the Court intended (after the now-completed supplemental briefing) to side with whichever of the two positions was most reasonable, the Court GRANTS Power's motion to strike, finding this not to be an "extreme" sanction under the circumstances. As proposed by Power, Fairchild is permitted to provide new expert reports limited to and consistent with its timely contentions submitted prior to the close of fact discovery. The parties shall SUBMIT a proposed order modifying the scheduling order, while keeping this case on track for the currently-scheduled trial, no later than October 27, 2014. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/22/14. (ntl)
October 22, 2014 Filing 161 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Enrique D. Duarte as co-counsel. Reason for request: No longer at firm. (Marsden, William)
October 17, 2014 Filing 160 REDACTED VERSION of #158 Letter, by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, System General Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I - O)(Maguire, Lauren)
October 15, 2014 Filing 159 REDACTED VERSION of #157 Letter, to Honorable Leonard P. Stark from William J. Marsden, Jr. by Power Integrations Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 10-17)(Marsden, William)
October 10, 2014 Filing 158 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Chief Judge Leonard P. Stark from Lauren E. Maguire regarding Fairchild's supplemental letter brief regarding discovery dispute. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I, #2 Exhibit J, #3 Exhibit K, #4 Exhibit L, #5 Exhibit M, #6 Exhibit N, #7 Exhibit O)(Maguire, Lauren)
October 8, 2014 Filing 157 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from William J. Marsden, Jr. regarding Power Integrations' supplemental letter brief regarding discovery dispute - re #150 Letter, #153 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 10-17, #2 Certificate of Service)(Marsden, William)
October 7, 2014 Filing 156 REDACTED VERSION of #153 Letter by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, System General Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - H)(Mayo, Andrew)
October 6, 2014 Filing 155 REDACTED VERSION of #150 Letter to Judge Stark from William Marsden by Power Integrations Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-3, #2 Exhibit 4-9, #3 Certificate of Service)(Marsden, William)
October 6, 2014 Filing 154 REDACTED VERSION of #151 Letter, by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, System General Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - E)(Mayo, Andrew)
October 3, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark - Discovery Teleconference held on 10/3/2014. (Court Reporter B. Gaffigan.) (ntl)
October 1, 2014 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Charles J. Hawkins for Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (dmp, )
September 30, 2014 Filing 153 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Chief Judge Leonard P. Stark from Lauren E. Maguire regarding response to Power Integrations' opening discovery dispute letter - re #150 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-H)(Maguire, Lauren)
September 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Discovery Teleconference set for 10/2/14 is CANCELLED and is hereby re-scheduled for 10/3/2014 at 10:30 AM. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/30/14. (ntl)
September 29, 2014 Filing 151 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Chief Judge Leonard P. Stark from Andrew C. Mayo regarding discovery dispute - re 149 Oral Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Mayo, Andrew)
September 29, 2014 Filing 150 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from William J. Marsden, Jr. regarding discovery dispute - re 149 Oral Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-9, #2 Certificate of Service)(Marsden, William)
September 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORAL ORDER: Because of the upcoming holiday, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the discovery letter submissions are due on September 29 and September 30. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/23/14. (ntl)
September 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORAL ORDER: After having been advised by Plaintiffs and Defendant of their inability to resolve a discovery matter, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a teleconference is scheduled for October 2, 2014 at 3:00 p.m. Counsel for the party seeking relief shall initiate the teleconference call to 302-573-4573. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that not later than September 25, 2014 at 3:00 p.m., any party seeking relief shall file with the Court a letter, not to exceed three (3) pages, outlining the issues in dispute and its position on those issues. Not later than September 26, 2014 at 3:00 p.m., any party opposing the application for relief may file a letter, not to exceed three (3) pages, outlining that party's reasons for its opposition. Each party shall submit to the Court two (2) courtesy copies of its discovery letter and any attachments. Should the Court find further briefing necessary upon conclusion of the telephone conference, the Court will order it. Alternatively, the Court may choose to resolve the dispute prior to the telephone conference and will, in that event, cancel the conference. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/17/14. (ntl)
September 11, 2014 Filing 147 Joint Letter to Honorable Leonard P. Stark from William J. Marsden, Jr. regarding request for discovery teleconference. (Marsden, William)
August 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORAL ORDERL: A teleconference has been scheduled for 8/15/14 at 4:00 PM EASTERN TIME with Judge Thynge. William J. Marsden, Jr., Esquire shall initiate the teleconference call. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 8/11/14. (cak)
June 30, 2014 Filing 145 REPLY BRIEF re #121 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer Under Rule 15 filed by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, System General Corporation. (Day, John)
June 27, 2014 Filing 144 REDACTED VERSION of #140 Declaration of William J. Marsden, Jr. by Power Integrations Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-G)(Marsden, William)
June 27, 2014 Filing 143 REDACTED VERSION of #139 Answering Brief in Opposition by Power Integrations Inc.. (Marsden, William)
June 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 142 SO ORDERED, re #141 Stipulation and Order Regarding Schedule for Expert Reports, Dispositive/Daubert Motions, and Trial -- Dispositive/Daubert Motions due by 11/21/2014, A 9-day Jury Trial is set for 5/26/2015 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6B, A Motion Hearing is set for 3/3/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6B, A Pretrial Conference is set for 4/24/2015 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 6B. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 6/24/14. (ntl)
June 23, 2014 Filing 141 Proposed STIPULATION Regarding Schedule for Expert Reports, Dispositive/Daubert Motions, and Trial by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Power Integrations Inc., System General Corporation. (Day, John)
June 20, 2014 Filing 140 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #139 Answering Brief in Opposition of William J. Marsden, Jr. by Power Integrations Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B, #2 Exhibit C-D, #3 Exhibit E-G)(Marsden, William)
June 20, 2014 Filing 139 [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #121 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer Under Rule 15 filed by Power Integrations Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 6/30/2014. (Marsden, William)
June 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the February 9, 2015 trial is CANCELLED and is hereby rescheduled for May 26-June 5, 2015. The Pretrial Conference is rescheduled for April 24, 2015 at 11:30. The parties shall submit a revised proposed scheduling order, which includes the above dates and any interim dates, by June 23, 2014. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 6/18/14. (ntl)
June 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORAL ORDER: For the reasons stated in Court at the conclusion of the hearing today, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Fairchild's (i) request to amend the case to add claims of infringement of its '915 patent (D.I. 125) is DENIED, (ii) motion to bifurcate (D.I. 127) is DENIED, and (iii) motion for leave to amend answer (D.I. 121) shall be briefed according to the Local Rules. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 6/16/14. (ntl)
June 16, 2014 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Patrick Stafford for Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation added for electronic noticing. Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-00309-LPS, 1:04-cv-01371-LPS, 1:12-cv-00540-LPS(els)
June 13, 2014 Filing 136 Letter to Honorable Leonard P. Stark from William J. Marsden, Jr. regarding preliminary response to Fairchild's motion to Amend Pleadings and bifurcate trial - re 132 Oral Order,,,,. (Marsden, William)
June 13, 2014 Filing 135 REDACTED VERSION of #129 Declaration of Christina A. Ondrick by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, System General Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A thru N)(Mayo, Andrew)
June 13, 2014 Filing 134 REDACTED VERSION of #128 Opening Brief in Support, by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, System General Corporation. (Mayo, Andrew)
June 13, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #133 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Patrick Stafford filed by System General Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 6/13/14. (ntl)
June 12, 2014 Filing 133 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Patrick Stafford - filed by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, System General Corporation. (Day, John)
June 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORAL ORDER: Having reviewed the parties' letters relating to scheduling conflicts of counsel and the potential addition of U.S. Patent No. 8,461,915 to the case (D.I. 125, 131), as well as Fairchild's pending motion for leave to amend (D.I. 121) and motion to bifurcate trial (D.I. 127), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that (i) Power Integrations shall file a preliminary response to the pending motions (D.I. 121, 127) in a letter not to exceed three (3) pages, due no later than Saturday, June 14, and in its letter Power Integrations shall also explain the scheduling conflict and whether Power Integrations is asking this Court to change the trial date; and (ii) the parties shall be prepared to address the scheduling dispute in light of the Fairchild's pending letter request (D.I. 125) and motions for leave to amend (D.I. 121) and bifurcate (D.I. 127) during oral argument scheduled for June 16, 2014 in the related C.A. No. 08-309 (D.I. 770). ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 6/12/14. (ntl)
June 11, 2014 Filing 131 Letter to Honorable Leonard P. Stark from William J. Marsden, Jr. regarding Case schedule and Fairchild '915 Patent - re 130 Oral Order,. (Marsden, William)
June 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORAL ORDER: Having reviewed Fairchild's letter regarding case schedule and Fairchilds 915 patent (D.I. 125), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Power Integrations shall file a response letter not to exceed three (3) pages no later than Wednesday, June 11. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 6/10/14. (ntl)
June 6, 2014 Filing 129 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #128 Opening Brief in Support, (Declaration of Christina A. Ondrick) by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, System General Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A through N)(Maguire, Lauren)
June 6, 2014 Filing 128 [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re #127 MOTION to Bifurcate the Trial Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 42(b) filed by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, System General Corporation.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 6/23/2014. (Maguire, Lauren)
June 6, 2014 Filing 127 MOTION to Bifurcate the Trial Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 42(b) - filed by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, System General Corporation. (Maguire, Lauren)
June 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER Setting Mediation Conferences: A Continued Mediation Conference is set for 8/28/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2B before Judge Mary Pat Thynge. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 6/6/14. (cak)
June 4, 2014 Filing 125 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Lauren E. Maguire regarding case schedule and Fairchild's '915 patent. (Maguire, Lauren)
June 3, 2014 Filing 124 DECLARATION re #121 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer Under Rule 15 (Declaration of Christina A. Ondrick) by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, System General Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A and B)(Day, John)
June 3, 2014 Filing 123 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #121 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer Under Rule 15 filed by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, System General Corporation.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 6/20/2014. (Day, John)
June 3, 2014 Filing 122 PROPOSED ORDER Granting Fairchild's Motion for Leave to File an Amended Answer Under Rule 15 re #121 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer Under Rule 15 by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, System General Corporation. (Day, John)
June 3, 2014 Filing 121 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer Under Rule 15 - filed by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, System General Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (First Amended Answer), #2 Exhibit B (Redlined Version of First Amended Answer))(Day, John)
May 19, 2014 Filing 120 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Notice of Deposition of Steven Fu and Vijay Ullal filed by Power Integrations Inc..(Warden, Joseph)
May 13, 2014 Filing 119 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation and System General's Second Supplemental Response to Defendant Power Integrations' First Set of Interrogatory [No. 14] filed by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, System General Corporation.(Maguire, Lauren)
May 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORAL ORDER: Teleconferences with Judge Thynge have been scheduled for 5/28/14 as follows: 4:30 PM EASTERN TIME with Power Integrations ONLY, Power Integrations's counsel to initiate the teleconference call; 5:00 PM EASTERN TIME with Fairchild ONLY, Fairchild's counsel to initiate the teleconference call; and, if necessary, 5:30 PM EASTERN TIME with both parties with the joint teleconference to be organized by Fairchild's counsel. It is recommended, if possible, that principals participate in the teleconferences. The purpose of the serial teleconferences is to provide an update on the parties' further negotiations and to discuss continued mediation on August 28, September 3, or September 5, 2014. Ordered by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 5/2/14. (cak) Modified on 5/2/2014 (cak).
May 2, 2014 CORRECTING ENTRY: DI 118 -- corrected text of oral order. The 4:30 PM teleconference with Judge Thynge on 5/28/14 is with Power Integrations ONLY. Power Integrations' counsel to initiate the teleconference call. (cak)
April 24, 2014 Set/Reset Hearings: A Pretrial Conference is set for 1/27/2015 at (time to be determined) in Courtroom 6B before Judge Leonard P. Stark. (ntl)
April 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 117 SO ORDERED, re #116 Stipulation Setting Scheduling Order Deadlines: (A Pretrial Conference is set for 1/27/2015 at TBD. Dispositive Motions due by 10/1/2014. Answering Brief due 10/15/2014. Reply Brief due 10/22/2014. A Jury Trial is set for 2/9-20/2015 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6B before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/22/2014. (rpg) Modified on 4/23/2014 (rpg).
April 23, 2014 Remark: Pretrial Conference is set for 1/27/2015 at TBD. (rpg)
April 4, 2014 Filing 116 Joint STIPULATION and Proposed Order Regarding Schedule for Expert Reports, Dispositive/Daubert Motions, and Trial by Power Integrations Inc.. (Marsden, William)
March 21, 2014 Filing 115 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation and System General Corporation's Third Supplemental Invalidity Contentions filed by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, System General Corporation.(Maguire, Lauren)
January 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER Setting Mediation Conferences: A Mediation Conference is set for 5/1/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2B before Judge Mary Pat Thynge. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. SEE NEW PARAGRAPH 10 REGARDING WIFI. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 1/9/14. (cak)
January 7, 2014 Filing 113 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Notice of Depositions of Dan Kinzer, Steve McGowan, YB Park, Jay Lee, James Lee, Vijay Ullal, Kenny Chan, Steve Fu, Richard Kim and Philip Thach filed by Power Integrations Inc..(Marsden, William)
January 7, 2014 Filing 112 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Supplemental Disclosure of Asserted Patents and Accused Products Pursuant to Para 4 of Default Standard filed by Power Integrations Inc..(Marsden, William)
December 23, 2013 Filing 111 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Rose S. Whelan as co-counsel.. (Mayo, Andrew)
December 20, 2013 Filing 110 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Second Supplemental Initial Disclosures filed by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, System General Corporation.(Day, John)
December 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORAL ORDER: The mediation scheduled for 1/10/14 at 8:30 AM with Judge Thynge is cancelled and will be rescheduled at a later date. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 12/20/13. (cak)
December 10, 2013 Filing 108 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Supplemental Initial Disclosures by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, System General Corporation.(Day, John)
December 10, 2013 Filing 107 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Supplemental Discovery Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 4 of The Delaware Default Standard for Discovery by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, System General Corporation.(Day, John)
December 10, 2013 Filing 106 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Response to Second Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 24-33) and Supplemental Infringement Claim Charts by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, System General Corporation.(Mayo, Andrew)
December 9, 2013 Filing 105 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Notice of Deposition of Gary Lin Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 30(b)(1) and Notice of Deposition of Ta-Yung ("Tom") Yang Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 30(b)(1) by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, System General Corporation.(Day, John)
December 6, 2013 Filing 104 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Objections and Responses to 30(b)(6) Notice of Deposition by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, System General Corporation.(Day, John)
December 5, 2013 Filing 103 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Notice of Depositions of Tom Yang, Gary Lin, WH Huang and Michael Weirich by Power Integrations Inc..(Marsden, William)
November 22, 2013 Filing 102 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation's and System General Corporation's Fourth Set of Interrogatories to Defendant Power Integrations, Inc. and Plaintiffs Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation's and System General Corporation's First Set of Requests for Admissions to Defendant Power Integrations, Inc. by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, System General Corporation.(Mayo, Andrew)
November 14, 2013 Filing 101 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Power Integrations second set of Interrogatories to Fairchild (Nos 24-33) by Power Integrations Inc..(Marsden, William)
November 5, 2013 Filing 100 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Power Integrations Notice of Deposition of Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation and System General Corporation Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) by Power Integrations Inc..(Marsden, William)
November 5, 2013 Filing 99 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Power Integrations' Supplemental Responses and Objections to Fairchild's Interrogatories [Nos. 17, 28, 31] by Power Integrations Inc..(Marsden, William)
November 1, 2013 Filing 98 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Third Set of Interrogatories to Defendant and Second Set of Requests for Production of Documents and Things to Defendant by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, System General Corporation.(Maguire, Lauren)
October 29, 2013 Filing 97 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Notice of Deposition of Cliff Walker Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 30(b)(1) by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, System General Corporation.(Day, John)
October 25, 2013 Filing 96 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Robert Walters - filed by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, System General Corporation. (Mayo, Andrew)
October 25, 2013 Filing 95 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Charles J. Hawkins - filed by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, System General Corporation. (Mayo, Andrew)
October 25, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #96 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Robert Walters filed by System General Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation; #95 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Charles J. Hawkins filed by System General Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/25/13. (ntl)
October 23, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #94 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Extend fact and expert discovery deadlines to various filed by Power Integrations Inc. -- Fact Discovery due by 12/23/2013, Dispositive Motions due by 4/18/2014. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/23/13. (ntl)
October 21, 2013 Filing 94 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Extend fact and expert discovery deadlines to various - filed by Power Integrations Inc.. (Marsden, William)
October 10, 2013 Filing 93 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation and System General's Supplemental Response to Defendant Power Integrations' Interrogatory [No. 13] by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, System General Corporation.(Mayo, Andrew)
October 8, 2013 Filing 92 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Notices of Deposition of Stuart Hodge, Balu Balakrishnan, Ben Sutherland, Andrew Smith, Yury Gaknoki and Yu Shan (Anthony) Wu by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, System General Corporation.(Mayo, Andrew)
September 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER Setting Teleconference: Plaintiffs' counsel to initiate the call. A Telephone Conference is set for 12/19/2013 at 03:00 PM EASTERN TIME before Judge Mary Pat Thynge to discuss the status of the case and mediation. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 9/19/13. (cak)
September 18, 2013 Filing 90 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Power Integrations' Designations and Objections in Response to Defendants' 30(b)(6) Deposition Notice by Power Integrations Inc..(Marsden, William)
September 18, 2013 Filing 89 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Power Integration's Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs Second Set of Interrogatories No 27-31] by Power Integrations Inc..(Marsden, William)
September 9, 2013 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Alexander P. Ott for Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation added for electronic noticing. (dmp, )
August 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER regarding claim construction re #87 Memorandum Opinion. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/28/2013. (rpg)
August 28, 2013 Filing 87 MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding claim construction. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/28/2013. (rpg)
August 22, 2013 Filing 86 Official Transcript of Claim Construction Hearing held on July 15, 2013 before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Brian P. Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/12/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/23/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/20/2013. (bpg)
August 8, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #85 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Alexander Ott filed by System General Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/8/2013. (rpg)
August 5, 2013 Filing 85 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Alexander Ott - filed by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, System General Corporation. (Mayo, Andrew)
August 5, 2013 Filing 84 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' First Notice of Deposition Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 30(b)(6) by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, System General Corporation.(Day, John)
August 1, 2013 Filing 83 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Second Set of Interrogatories to Defendant by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, System General Corporation.(Mayo, Andrew)
August 1, 2013 Filing 82 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Plaintiffs' Notice of Deposition of Andrew Smith Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 30(b)(1); (2) Plaintiffs' Notice of Deposition of David Kung Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 30(b)(1); (3) Plaintiffs' Notice of Deposition of Silvestro Fimiani Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 30(b)(1); (4) Plaintiffs' Notice of Deposition of Balu Balakrishnan Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 30(b)(1); (5) Plaintiffs' Notice of Deposition of Michael Matthews Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 30(b)(1); and (6) Plaintiffs' Notice of Deposition of Tiziano Pastore Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 30(b)(1) by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, System General Corporation.(Mayo, Andrew)
July 16, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #81 Stipulation and Order Regarding Discovery and Dispositive/Daubert Motions Deadline -- Discovery due by 10/14/2013, Dispositive Motions due by 4/11/2014. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/16/13. (ntl)
July 15, 2013 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark - Markman Hearing held on 7/15/2013. (Court Reporter B. Gaffigan.) (ntl)
July 15, 2013 Filing 81 STIPULATION to Amend Certain Deadlines in the Scheduling Order by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Power Integrations Inc., System General Corporation. (Mayo, Andrew)
June 25, 2013 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Jeremiah A. Armstrong for Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation added for electronic noticing. (dmp, )
June 18, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #80 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jeremiah A. Armstrong filed by System General Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 6/18/13. (ntl)
June 17, 2013 Filing 80 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jeremiah A. Armstrong - filed by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, System General Corporation. (Mayo, Andrew)
June 14, 2013 Filing 79 STATEMENT (Plaintiffs' Comments Concerning Defendant's Technology Tutorial) by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, System General Corporation. (Day, John)
June 14, 2013 Filing 78 NOTICE of Comments on Fairchild's Technology Tutorial by Power Integrations Inc. re #66 Letter (Marsden, William)
May 31, 2013 Filing 77 [SEALED] MULTI MEDIA DOCUMENT filed by Power Integrations Inc. in the form of a DVD. Filing related to #67 Notice of Filing Multi Media Materials. (Media on file in Clerk's Office). (ntl)
May 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that each side will be allocated two (2) hours for argument at the Markman Hearing scheduled for July 15, 2013. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/31/13. (ntl)
May 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORAL ORDER Setting Teleconference: Counsel for Power Integrations to initiate the call. A Telephone Conference is set for 9/19/2013 at 11:00 AM EASTERN TIME before Judge Mary Pat Thynge. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 5/28/13. (cak)
May 24, 2013 Filing 74 DECLARATION re #72 Claim Construction Answering Brief (Declaration of Christina A. Ondrick) by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, System General Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(Day, John)
May 24, 2013 Filing 73 DECLARATION re #72 Claim Construction Answering Brief (Declaration of Gu-Yeon Wei) by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, System General Corporation. (Day, John)
May 24, 2013 Filing 72 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ANSWERING BRIEF re #59 Claim Construction Opening Brief filed by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, System General Corporation. (Day, John)
May 24, 2013 Filing 71 DECLARATION re #69 Claim Construction Answering Brief of Arthur W. Kelley in Support of Power Integrations Inc.'s Answering Claim Construction Brief by Power Integrations Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A, #2 Attachment B, #3 Attachment C)(Marsden, William)
May 24, 2013 Filing 70 Supplemental DECLARATION re #69 Claim Construction Answering Brief of William J. Marsden in Support of Power Integrations, Inc.'s Answering Claim Construction Brief by Power Integrations Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 30-32)(Marsden, William)
May 24, 2013 Filing 69 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ANSWERING BRIEF re #60 Claim Construction Opening Brief, #59 Claim Construction Opening Brief filed by Power Integrations Inc.. (Marsden, William)
May 24, 2013 Filing 68 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from John G. Day regarding July 15, 2013 claim construction hearing. (Day, John)
May 24, 2013 Filing 67 NOTICE of filing the following document(s) in multi media format: cover letter enclosing Defendant's Technology Tutorial DVD re claim construction. Original material(s) to be filed with the Clerk's Office. Notice filed by William J. Marsden, Jr on behalf of Power Integrations Inc. (Marsden, William)
May 24, 2013 Filing 66 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Andrew C. Mayo regarding Plaintiffs' technology tutorial. (Mayo, Andrew)
May 16, 2013 Filing 65 ANSWER to #57 Answer to Counterclaim, by Power Integrations Inc..(Marsden, William)
May 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORAL ORDER Setting Teleconference: Plaintiff's counsel to initiate the call. The teleconference with Judge Thynge to discuss the status of the case scheduled for 5/16/2013 at 11:00 AM EASTERN TIME has been rescheduled to 5/28/13 at 11:00 AM EASTERN TIME. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 5/14/13. (cak)
April 29, 2013 Filing 63 DECLARATION re #59 Claim Construction Opening Brief of William J. Marsden, Jr. by Power Integrations Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 part 1, #2 Exhibit 1 part 2, #3 Exhibit 2-7, #4 Exhibit 8-10, #5 Exhibit 11-16, #6 Exhibit 17-22, #7 Exhibit 23-24, #8 Exhibit 25-26, #9 Exhibit 27-28, #10 Exhibit 29)(Marsden, William)
April 29, 2013 Filing 62 DECLARATION re #60 Claim Construction Opening Brief (Declaration of Rose S. Whelan) by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, System General Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(Day, John)
April 29, 2013 Filing 61 DECLARATION re #60 Claim Construction Opening Brief (Declaration of Gu-Yeon Wei) by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, System General Corporation. (Day, John)
April 29, 2013 Filing 60 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION OPENING BRIEF filed by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, System General Corporation. (Day, John)
April 29, 2013 Filing 59 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION OPENING BRIEF filed by Power Integrations Inc.. (Marsden, William)
April 24, 2013 Filing 58 Interim STATUS REPORT by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Power Integrations Inc., System General Corporation. (Day, John)
April 22, 2013 Filing 57 ANSWER to #11 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim,, , COUNTERCLAIM against Power Integrations Inc. by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, System General Corporation.(Lydon, Tiffany)
April 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Court's Order at D.I. #55 is amended as follows: answering claim construction briefs shall be limited to 20 pages. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/9/13. (ntl)
April 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 55 SO ORDERED, re #54 Stipulation and Order Regarding Markman Briefing and Technology Tutorials -- Claim Construction Answering Brief due by 5/24/2013, Claim Construction Opening Brief due by 4/29/2013. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/4/13. (ntl)
April 2, 2013 Filing 54 STIPULATION to amend scheduling order by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Power Integrations Inc., System General Corporation. (Mayo, Andrew)
March 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER re #52 Memorandum Opinion -- #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or in the alternative for a more definite statement filed by Power Integrations Inc. is DENIED as moot; #13 MOTION to Dismiss Power Integrations' Counterclaims filed by System General Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation is GRANTED with respect to the inducement counterclaims based on pre-filing conduct and DENIED in all other respects. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/29/13. (ntl)
March 29, 2013 Filing 52 MEMORANDUM OPINION re motions to dismiss. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/29/13. (ntl)
March 29, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #50 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Submit the Joint Claim Chart of Proposed Claim Constructions to March 28, 2013. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/29/13. (ntl)
March 28, 2013 Filing 51 CLAIM Construction Chart by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Power Integrations Inc., System General Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E-1 - E-2, #6 Exhibit E-3 - E-4)(Maguire, Lauren)
March 28, 2013 Filing 50 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Submit the Joint Claim Chart of Proposed Claim Constructions to March 28, 2013 - filed by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Power Integrations Inc., System General Corporation. (Mayo, Andrew)
February 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER Setting Teleconference: Plaintiff's counsel to initiate the call. A Telephone Conference is set for 5/16/2013 at 11:00 AM before Judge Mary Pat Thynge to discuss the status of the case. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 2/27/13. (cak)
January 10, 2013 Filing 48 NOTICE of of Withdrawal by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, System General Corporation re #38 MOTION for Leave to File an Amended Complaint (Maguire, Lauren)
January 9, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #47 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME by which plaintiffs shall file their reply brief in support of their motion for leave to file an amended complaint to January 10, 2013 filed by Power Integrations Inc., System General Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/9/13. (ntl)
January 7, 2013 Filing 47 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME by which plaintiffs shall file their reply brief in support of their motion for leave to file an amended complaint to January 10, 2013 - filed by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Power Integrations Inc., System General Corporation. (Mayo, Andrew)
January 2, 2013 Filing 46 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Michael F. Martin as co-counsel.. (Mayo, Andrew)
December 31, 2012 Filing 45 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Power Integrations Responses and Objections to Fairchilds 1st set of Request for Production No 1-107 by Power Integrations Inc..(Marsden, William)
December 31, 2012 Filing 44 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Power Integrations Responses to Fairchild 1st set of Interrogatories No. 1-26 by Power Integrations Inc..(Marsden, William)
December 28, 2012 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #43 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Fairchild to file their reply brief in support of their Motion to File an Amended Complaint to January 7, 2013 filed by Power Integrations Inc., System General Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/28/2012. (rpg)
December 27, 2012 Filing 43 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Fairchild to file their reply brief in support of their Motion to File an Amended Complaint to January 7, 2013 - filed by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Power Integrations Inc., System General Corporation. (Mayo, Andrew)
December 20, 2012 Filing 42 DECLARATION re #41 Answering Brief in Opposition of Enrique Duarte by Power Integrations Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-4)(Marsden, William)
December 20, 2012 Filing 41 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #38 MOTION for Leave to File an Amended Complaint filed by Power Integrations Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 1/2/2013. (Marsden, William)
December 3, 2012 Filing 40 DECLARATION re #39 MEMORANDUM in Support, (Declaration of Christina A. Ondrick) by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, System General Corporation. (Maguire, Lauren)
December 3, 2012 Filing 39 MEMORANDUM in Support re #38 MOTION for Leave to File an Amended Complaint filed by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, System General Corporation.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 12/20/2012. (Maguire, Lauren)
December 3, 2012 Filing 38 MOTION for Leave to File an Amended Complaint - filed by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, System General Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A (Second Amended Complaint), #3 Exhibit 1 through 5 to Second Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit B (Blacklined Version of Second Amended Complaint))(Maguire, Lauren)
November 30, 2012 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #37 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Roozbeh Gorgin filed by System General Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 11/30/12. (ntl)
November 29, 2012 Filing 37 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Roozbeh Gorgin - filed by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, System General Corporation. (Maguire, Lauren)
November 1, 2012 Filing 36 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation and System General Corporation's First Set of Interrogatories to Defendant Power Integrations, Inc. and (2) Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation and System General Corporation's First Set of Requests for Production and Things to Defendant Power Integrations, Inc. by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, System General Corporation.(Mayo, Andrew)
October 19, 2012 Filing 35 Official Transcript of Telephone Conference held on September 19, 2012 before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/9/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/19/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/17/2013. (bpg)
October 12, 2012 Filing 34 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Power Integrations Disclosure of Asserted Patents and Accused Products by Power Integrations Inc..(Marsden, William)
October 11, 2012 Filing 33 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation and System General Corporation's Initial Discovery Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 4 of the Delaware Default Standard for Discovery by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, System General Corporation.(Mayo, Andrew)
October 9, 2012 Filing 32 NOTICE of Change of Address for Blair M. Jacobs, Christina A. Ondrick and Rose S. Whelan of McDermott Will & Emery LLP by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, System General Corporation (Mayo, Andrew)
October 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORAL ORDER: A teleconference has been scheduled for 2/27/2013 at 12:00 Noon with Judge Thynge to discuss ADR. Counsel for defendant Power Integrations shall initiate the teleconference call. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 10/8/2012. (cak)
October 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Setting Teleconference: Plaintiffs' counsel to initiate the call. A Telephone Conference is set for 10/9/2012 at 09:00 AM before Judge Mary Pat Thynge to discuss ADR. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 10/1/2012. (cak)
October 1, 2012 CASE REFERRED to Judge Thynge for Mediation. (cak)
September 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case referred to the Magistrate Judge for the purpose of exploring ADR. Joinder of Parties due by 5/16/2013. Amended Pleadings due by 5/16/2013. Discovery due by 9/13/2013. Status Report due by 4/24/2013. Dispositive Motions due by 3/13/2014. Claim Construction Opening Brief due by 4/18/2013. Claim Construction Answering Brief due by 5/23/2013. A Markman Hearing is set for 7/15/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6B. A Pretrial Conference is set for 10/2/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6B. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/25/2014. A 10-day Jury Trial is set for 10/13/2014 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6B. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/28/12. (Attachment: #1 Form of Pretrial Order)(ntl)
September 25, 2012 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #26 PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by Power Integrations Inc., System General Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/25/12. (ntl)
September 21, 2012 Filing 28 PROPOSED ORDER Scheduling Order by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Power Integrations Inc., System General Corporation. (Day, John)
September 21, 2012 Filing 27 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from John G. Day regarding Proposed Scheduling Order. (Day, John)
September 21, 2012 Filing 26 PROPOSED ORDER (Proposed Protective Order) by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Power Integrations Inc., System General Corporation. (Maguire, Lauren)
September 20, 2012 Filing 25 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Discovery Disclosures Pursuant to Section 3 of the Delaware Default Standard for Discovery by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, System General Corporation.(Day, John)
September 20, 2012 Filing 24 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Disclosures Pursuant to Section 3 of the Delaware Default Standard for Discovery by Power Integrations Inc..(Marsden, William)
September 19, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark - Telephone Conference held on 9/19/2012. (Court Reporter B. Gaffigan.) (ntl)
September 13, 2012 Filing 23 NOTICE OF SERVICE of INITIAL DISCLOSURSES by Power Integrations Inc..(Marsden, William)
September 12, 2012 Filing 22 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, System General Corporation.(Maguire, Lauren)
August 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a Rule 16 scheduling teleconference has been scheduled for September 19, 2012 at 11:00 a.m. Plaintiffs' counsel shall initiate the teleconference call to 302-573-4571. No further submissions are needed. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/28/12. (ntl)
August 13, 2012 Filing 20 PROPOSED ORDER (Proposed Scheduling Order) by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Power Integrations Inc., System General Corporation. (Mayo, Andrew)
August 13, 2012 Filing 19 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Andrew C. Mayo regarding the parties' proposed form of scheduling order. (Mayo, Andrew)
August 13, 2012 Filing 18 REPLY BRIEF re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Motion to Dismiss Power Integrations' Counterclaims) filed by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, System General Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Mayo, Andrew)
August 2, 2012 Filing 17 DECLARATION re #16 Answering Brief in Opposition, (Declaration of William J. Marsden, Jr.) by Power Integrations Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-4)(Marsden, William)
August 2, 2012 Filing 16 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Motion to Dismiss Power Integrations' Counterclaims) filed by Power Integrations Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 8/13/2012. (Marsden, William)
July 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall confer regarding proposed dates in the scheduling order and shall submit a proposal to the Court no later than August 13, 2012. The parties are to review the Court's form scheduling order, which is posted at http://www.ded.uscourts.gov (see Chambers, Judge Stark, Forms). ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/30/12. (ntl)
July 16, 2012 Filing 14 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Motion to Dismiss Power Integrations' Counterclaims) filed by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, System General Corporation.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 8/2/2012. (Mayo, Andrew)
July 16, 2012 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Motion to Dismiss Power Integrations' Counterclaims) - filed by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, System General Corporation. (Mayo, Andrew)
July 9, 2012 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Michael F. Martin for Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation added for electronic noticing. (rbe)
July 9, 2012 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Terrence P. McMahon for Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation added for electronic noticing. (rbe)
June 25, 2012 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Leigh J. Martinson,Rose Whelan,Blair M. Jacobs,Christina A. Ondrick for Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation added for electronic noticing. (rbe)
June 21, 2012 Filing 12 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 6,229,366 B1; US 7,995,359 B2; US 7,952,895 B2; US 7,876,587 B2; US 8,115,457 B2; . (Marsden, William)
June 21, 2012 Filing 11 ANSWER to Amended Complaint ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Power Integrations Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 6229366, #2 Exhibit B - 7995359, #3 Exhibit C - 7952895, #4 Exhibit D - 7876587, #5 Exhibit E - 8115457)(Marsden, William)
June 19, 2012 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Michael R. Headley,Enrique D. Duarte for Power Integrations Inc. added for electronic noticing. (dmp, )
June 15, 2012 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Terrence P. McMahon, Blair M. Jacobs, Leigh J. Martinson, Christina A. Ondrick, Rose Whelan, and Michael F. Martin filed by System General Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 6/15/12. (ntl)
June 14, 2012 Filing 10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Terrence P. McMahon, Blair M. Jacobs, Leigh J. Martinson, Christina A. Ondrick, Rose Whelan, and Michael F. Martin - filed by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, System General Corporation. (Day, John)
June 4, 2012 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Power Integrations Inc.- filed by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, System General Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Day, John)
May 22, 2012 Filing 8 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Power Integrations Inc.. (Marsden, William)
May 22, 2012 Filing 7 DECLARATION re #6 Opening Brief in Support, #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or in the alternative for a more definite statement of William J. Marsden, Jr. by Power Integrations Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-6)(Marsden, William)
May 22, 2012 Filing 6 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or in the alternative for a more definite statement filed by Power Integrations Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 6/8/2012. (Marsden, William)
May 22, 2012 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or in the alternative for a more definite statement - filed by Power Integrations Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Marsden, William)
May 21, 2012 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Frank E. Scherkenbach, Howard G. Pollack, Michael R. Headley, and Enrique D. Duarte filed by Power Integrations Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/21/12. (ntl)
May 18, 2012 Filing 4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Frank E. Scherkenbach, Howard G. Pollack, Michael R. Headley, and Enrique D. Duarte - filed by Power Integrations Inc.. (Marsden, William)
May 9, 2012 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
May 1, 2012 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,525,259; 7,286,123; 7,616,461; 7,259,972. (eam)
May 1, 2012 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction (eam)
May 1, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Power Integrations Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 16175.) - filed by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, System General Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Acknowledgement of Consent Form)(eam)
May 1, 2012 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Power Integrations Inc. on 5/1/2012. (eam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation et al v. Power Integrations Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: System General Corporation
Represented By: John G. Day
Represented By: Andrew Colin Mayo
Represented By: Lauren E. Maguire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation
Represented By: John G. Day
Represented By: Andrew Colin Mayo
Represented By: Pieter S. de Ganon
Represented By: Ryan J. Gatzemeyer
Represented By: Scott F. Llewellyn
Represented By: Lauren E. Maguire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation
Represented By: John G. Day
Represented By: Alexander P. Ott
Represented By: Robert J Walters
Represented By: Rose Whelan
Represented By: Terrence P. McMahon
Represented By: Jennifer L. Nall
Represented By: Michael A. Hawes
Represented By: Andrew Colin Mayo
Represented By: Jeremiah A. Armstrong
Represented By: Patrick Stafford
Represented By: Christina A. Ondrick
Represented By: Michael F. Martin
Represented By: Yar R. Chaikovsky
Represented By: Pieter S. de Ganon
Represented By: Ryan J. Gatzemeyer
Represented By: Scott F. Llewellyn
Represented By: Leigh J. Martinson
Represented By: Joshua Engel
Represented By: Charles J. Hawkins
Represented By: Blair M. Jacobs
Represented By: Lauren E. Maguire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Power Integrations Inc.
Represented By: William J. Marsden, Jr.
Represented By: Warren K. Mabey, Jr.
Represented By: Michael R. Headley
Represented By: Enrique D. Duarte
Represented By: Joseph B. Warden
Represented By: Douglas Edward McCann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special master: Allen M. -SM- Terrell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?