Abad-Castillo v. Dole Food Company Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jose Rosales-Rosales, Ivan Rafael Rubi-Chacon, Benigno De Jesus Ruiz-Badilla, Walter Saenz-Duarte, Rolando Sagot-Arias, Carlos Alberto Sagot-Campos, Carlos Salas-Arce, Luis Gerardo Salas-Medina, Rafael Angel Salas-Medina, Marvin Javier Salas-Monge, Carlos Luis Salas-Mora, Ismael Salas-Nunez, Eduardo Salas-Vindas, Jose Salazar-Arias, Jose Salazar-Chacon, Victor Julio Salazar-Eduarte, Marvin Salazar-Murillo, Gorzon Salazar-Rodriguez, Roberto Salazar-Salazar, Jose Maria Salazar-Vargas, Rafael Salgado-Avarado, Nicolas Salguero-Franco, Juan Jose Salmeron-Castillo, Jose Salon-Angulo, Jose Martin Sanabria-Cerdas, Felix Sanarrusia-Solis, Marcelino Sanchez-, Nicolas Antonio Sanchez-B., Alexander Sanchez-Barrantes, Pedro Sanchez-Elizondo, Inocencio Sanchez-Garcia, Pedro Antonio Sanchez-Gomez, Virgilio Sanchez-Herrera, Jose Angel Sanchez-Jimenez, Javier Sanchez-Loaiza, William Sanchez-Madrigal, Rafael Angel Sanchez-Marin, Rafael Sanchez-Porra, Marco Sanchez-Porras, Jose Francisco Sanchez-Quiros, Alvaro Sanchez-Salazar, Obed Alberto Sanchez-Serrano, Walter Sanchez-Zuniga, Jorge Sancho-Jimenez, Manuel Antonio Sandi-Johnson, Gerardino Sandi-Vargas, Rafael Angel Sandoval-Chinchilla, Martin Santana-Vargas, Martin Santos-Santos, Jose Napoleon Sarmiento-Sarmiento, Hernan Scarltte-Wagstalp, Marvin Segura-Castro, Luis Ricardo Segura-Ovares, Santos Segura-Vargas, Edgar Sequeira-Flores, Jose Angel Sequeira-Villegas, Luis Alberto Serrano-Georgiel, Salustino Jose Serrano-Perez, Hernan Sevilla-Olivas, Ovidio Sibaja-Perez, Orlando Sojo-Cerdas, Antonio Sojo-Cordero, Jose Gerardo Solano-Jimenez, Juan Jose Solano-Masis, Jorge Luis Solano-Menestel, Pedro Solano-Picado, Victor Julio Solano-Picado, Jorge Alberto Solano-Quiros, Gilberto Solis-Peraza, Emilio Abraham Solis-Rivera, Cayetano Soto-Cordero, Alexis Soto-Fernandez, Francisco Soto-Mena, Efrain Soto-Soto, Horacio Stonestreet-Arcia, Jorge Suarez-Morales, Carlos Luis Taylor-Taylor, Guillermo Enrique Taylor-Villareal, Oscar Tenorio-Bejarano, Felix Thomson-Thomson, Fabio Torres-A., Alfredo Antonio Torres-Corrales, Vernon Torres-Garcia, Benigno Torres-Hernandez, Victor Torres-Leon, Manuel Torres-Mora, Nemecio Torres-Torres, Jorge Trejos-Trejos, Carlos Fernando Ugalde-Rodriguez, Carlos Luis Umana-Mejias, Rafael Angel Urena-Rojas, Jesus Nicolas Urena-Vargas, Esquivel Urias-Chavarria, Rafael Cecilio. Valderramos-Bermuda, Francisco Valencia-Valencia, Martin Valerio-Chacon, Jose Luis Valladares-Rivera, Gilberto Valverde-Arroyo, Francisco Valverde-Gomez, Edwin Valverde-Valverde, Jose Fermindel Vanegas-Victor, Modesto Leonel Vanegas-Victor, Olger Vargas-Alfaro, Jose Alberto Vargas-Arguedas, Ricardo Vargas-Arguedas, Jose Eliecer Vargas-Dias, Oriel Vargas-Duran, Jose Manuel Vargas-Fernandez, Efrain Vargas-Mejia, Luis Vargas-Serrano, Jose Arturo Vargas-Urena, Luis Guillermo Vasquez-Brenes, Guadalupe Vega-Chaverri, Norman Vega-Chaverri, Gerardo Vega-Loaiza, Marcos Vega-Zamora, Ramon Francisco Vega-Zamora, Carlos Omar Velasquez-Solano, German Velasquez-Solano, Rafael Angel Velasquez-Zamora, Jorge Luis Venegas-Calvo, Pedro Francisco Venegas-Herrera, Juan Gerardo Victor-Victor, Jacinto Villafuerte-Obando, Jose Maximiliano Villafuerte-Ramirez, Jose Gerardo Villalobos-Artavia, Victor Julio Villalobos-Badilla, Herminio Villalobos-Jimenez, Juan Ramon Villalobos-Mairena, Marco Tulic Villalobos-Murillo, Ulises Villalobos-Quesada, Oscar Gerardo Villalobos-Ramirez, German Villalobos-Salazar, Raul Villareal-Pena, Pedro Villarreal-Barrantes, Cornelio Villarreal-Ortega, Santos Enrique Villarreal-Villarreal, Andres Villegas-Cruz, Danillo Vindas-Guerrero, Francisco Vindas-Rubi, Javier Viquez-Arias, Jose Angel Viquez-Brenes, Ramon Zuniga-Chacon, Leonel Zuniga-Rojas, German Zuniga-Roman, Juan Rafael Zuniga-Salas, Antonio Zuniga-Solano, Francisco Zuniga-Soto, Tomas Zuniga-Villarreal, Dogaberto Zuniga-Zuniga, Jose Angel Zuniga-Zuniga, Ricardo Abrego-A., Alejandro Abrego-Abrego, Andres Abrego-Abrego, Fernando Abrego-Abrego, Ignacio Abrego-Abrego, Roberto Abrego-Abrego, Federico Abrego-Beker, Martin Abrego-Beker, Martin Abrego-Castillo, Luis Abrego-Chi, Arturo Abrego-Chico, Valentin Abrego-Chico, Gavino Abrego-Chiro, Chale Abrego-Choba, Celestino Abrego-Chopa, Bentura Abrego-Chuto, Emiliano Abrego-Garay, Antonio Abrego-Ichi, Marchena Abrego-Ichi, Martin Abrego-Miranda, Jaime Abrego-Nico, Pedro Abrego-Ocho, Cornelio Abrego-Sandoya, Florentino Abrego-Santos, Benancio Abrego-Tico, Nicolas Abrigo-Nico, Manuel Acosta-Samudio, Alcibiades Alvarado-Pimentel, Daniel Alvarez-Guerrero, Felix Dimas Arauz-Atencio, Onesimo Arauz-Cortez, Feliciano Arauz-Guerra, Porfirio Arauz-Quintero, Celso Arauz-Sanchez, Fulvio Arauz-Viquez, Lorenzo Arcia-Morales, Palacio Arias-Chupa, Octavio Arjona-Rodriguez, Fernando Atencio-Flores, Carlos Enrique Atencio-Sanchez, Jose Angel Atencio-Vigil, Manuel Baker-Moral, Ricardo Barria-Pineda, Natividad Batista-Batista, Teodocio Baules-Rodriguez, Juan Becker-Becker, Gilberto Beitia-Castillo, Manuel Beker-Beker, William Beker-Mununimo, Gonzalo Beker-Santo, Simon Mariano Bernal, Hernando Bonilla-Atencio, Martin Bonilla-Jimenez, Manuel Enrique Caballero, Omar Ariel Caballero-Arauz, Humberto Caballero-Flores, Bolivar Caballero-Herrera, Jose Albinio Caballero-Samundio, Anibal Caballero-Tugri, Jesus Caballero-Valdes, Raimundo Caceres-Miranda, Mejia Bonifacio Carrera, Mario Carrera-Gonzalez, Santiago Carrera-Gonzalez, Pedro Carrizo-Miranda, Cornelio Castillo-Castillo, Juan Castillo-Castillo, Samuel Castillo-Castillo, Bolivar Castillo-Concepcion, Ramon Castillo-Garay, Daniel Castillo-Ichi, Roberto Castillo-Miranda, Francisco Castillo-Morales, Yimi Castillo-Nitgore, Demetrio Cedeno, Baldomero Cedeno-Caceres, Roman Cedeno-Cruz, Rogelio Cedeno-Gomez, Didimo Cedeno-Ortiz, Paulino Jose Cedeno-Quintero, Alexis Chavez-Morales, Cam Chichi-Taylor, Victor Harry Chin-M., Justo Chuito-Molina, Bernardino Cianca-Salinas, Santos Clemente-Juan, Enrique Corella-Arcia, Edgar Corella-Santamaria, Eduardo Cubilla-Carrillo, Gabriel De Garcia-Batista, Abundio De Garcia-Bejerano, Sadi De Gracia-De Leon, Hector De Leon-Justavino, Jorge Degracia-Bejerano, Manuel Eugenio Duarte-Sanchez, Victor Escalante-Alvarez, Eustasio Espinosa, Faustino Espinosa, Miguel Enrique Espinosa-Chacon, Pedro Flores-Ortega, Rufino Franco-Cortes, Hipolito Fuentes, Wilfredo Galdamez-Arias, Vicente Garay-Garay, Pablo Macario Garay-Santiago, Pablo Gomez, Miguel Gomez-Gonzalez, Eduardo Gomez-Ortega, Eustacio Gomez-Sanchez, Olmedo Gonzales-Mojica, Gilberto Elias Gonzalez, Jesus Gonzalez-Jordan, Miguel Gonzalez-Lezcano, Domingo Gonzalez-Miranda, Modesto Gonzalez-Pineda, Espolito Gonzalez-Sanchez, Mario Gonzalez-Sanchez, Agustin Gonzalez-Torres, Francisco Guerra E., Santiago Guerra-Becker, Alejandro Guerra-Beker, Celso Guerra-Gonzalez, William Guerra-Guerra, Marcelino Guerra-Morales, Vicente Guerra-Nichi, Rolando Guerra-Santos, Seferino Gutierrez-Martinez, Pedro Felipe Hawking-Jimenez, Jesus Hernandez-Delgado, Nicomedes Hernandez-Gonzalez, Luis Alberto Hernandez-Moreno, Elias Hernandez-Vasquez, Ceferino Herrera, Esteban Herrera-De Gracia, Alberto Hinds-Quintero, Celestino Hooker-Era, Mario Hurtado-Hurtado, Alejandro Jimenez, Francisco Jimenez, Pedro Jimenez, Martin Jimenez-Caballero, Roberto Jimenez-Caballero, Santalio Jimenez-Santo, Julio Jimenez-Santos, Manuel Jordan-Hernandez, Norberto Jose-Taylor, Felipe Julian-Jacobo, Federico Justavino-Tibibo, Simon Lezcano-Guerra, Lorenzo Lois-Smith, Valencio Lopez-Diaz, Alfredo Lopez-Lopez, Manuel Lorenzo-Rodriguez, Domingo Machado-Flores, Pedro Marquinez-Bordones, Hector Isabel Martinez-Arauz, Jose Flores Del Carm Martinez-Arauz, Nelson Martinez-Concepcion, Higinio Martinez-Miranda, Domingo Martinez-Morales, Reinaldo Martinez-Morales, Luis Martinez-Tito, Manuel Mayorga-Morediba, Domingo Mejia-Garcia, Eugenio Mendoza-Melendez, Felix Milton-Becker, Ricardo Alonso Miranda, Emiliano Miranda-Abrego, Porfirio Miranda-Concepcion, Ruben Miranda-Mojica, Pastor Miranda-Morales, Camilo Miranda-Romelis, Felipe Molina-Miranda, Juan Molino-Oto, Javier Franco Montenegro, Natividad Montes, Rodolfo Montezuma-Palacio, Daniel Morales, Marco Tulio Morales-Batista, Quintero Morales-Becker, Roger Morales-Atencio, Angel Morales-Gomez, Molino Morales-Morales, Juan Morales-Palacios, Guillermo Morales-Quintero, German Alcides Moreno-Castillo, Adamith Moreno-Montenegro, Alberto Munoz-Santos, Julio Cesar Najera-Murcia, Pablo Nelson Nieto-Peralta, Rene Ricardo Nunez-Moreno, Alberto Obando-Diaz, Jose Antonio Olaya-Serracin, Efrain Orribarra-Hernandez, Luis Alberto Ortiz-Cubilla, Arnulfo Ortiz-Mendez, Anderson Pablo-Jeff, Jose Armando Paizano-Levy, Pedro Palacio-Chuchi, Andres Palacio-Nicho, Jose Palacio-Nicho, Ignacio Palacio-Palacio, Simon Palacio-Palacio, Lucas Guillermo Palacios-Cerda, Jose Benjamin Paulino, Porfirio Pena-Gonzalea, Cristobal Perez-Morales, Ediomides Perez-Perez, Romelio Enrique Perez-Rogriguez, Isaac Pimentel-Delgado, Roy Rodrigo Pimentel-Pineda, Bernardo Luis Pineda, Mario Pineda, Antonio Isidro Pineda-E., Ramiro Pineda-Rodriguez, Victor Pinzon-Alvarez, Celso Pitti-Valdes, Rafael Polanco-Gonzalez, Heriberto Quintero-Benjamin, Francisco Quintero-Coingote, Abdiel Quintero-Espinosa, Santiago Quintero-Eugenio, Arturo Quintero-Jaen, Lucho Quintero-Jaen, Manuel Quintero-Moreno, Lucas Quintero-Nichi, Ceferino Quintero-Quintero, Ernesto Quintero-Quintero, Celio Quintero-Rojas, Daniel Quintero-Zapata, Benerito Quireri-Quireri, Eduardo Quiroz, Fernando Quiroz-Barrera, Jose Justantino Rayland, Isidro Reyes-Cano, Hermel Rios-Gantes, Humberto Rios-Lopez, Roger Rios-Sanchez, Dativo Rios-Santamaria, Lorenzo Robinson-P., Bernardino Rodriguez-Atencio, Narciso Rodriguez-Crochi, Paulino Rodriguez-Gonzalez, Ricci Rodriguez-Guerra, Julian Rodriguez-Ichi, Rafael Rodriguez-Leones, Idelfonso Rodriguez-Montenegro, Eustaquio Rojas-Sanchez, Luis Alberto Rosas, Braulio Rosas-Castillo, Ernesto Rosas-Castillo, Evangelisto Rosas-Castillo, Juan Rovira, Heriberto Rueda-Cedeno, Marselo Ruiz-Baker, Osvaldo Ruiz-Valdez, Irene Salinas-Santos, Alonso Samaniego-Perez, Octavio Samudio-Gonzalez, Alcides Sanches-Samudio, Carlos Sanchez, Anastacio Sanchez-Montenegro, Diogenes Sanjur-Sanchez, Tomas Santander-Baker, Marco Mauro Santiago, Jose Santiago-Briceno, Alfredo Santiago-Villagra, William Santo-Chichi, Federico Santo-Palacio, Leandro Santos, Julio Santos-Abrego, Jose Manuel Santos-Alvarado, Felipe Santos-Chito, Cesareo Santos-De Garcia, Alberto Santos-Flores, Ignacio Santos-Jimenez, Miguel Santos-Miller, Julio Santos-Morales, Guillermo Santos-Quintero, Ramos Santos-Santos, Daniel Serrano, Machado Serrano-Chito, Yini Serrano-Serrano, Ernesto Sirex-Jimenez, Federico Smith-Jimenez, Felicito Taylor-Santiago, Federico Tebora-Chito, Miguel Torres-Madrid, Remisther Danubio Troetsch-Pitty, Cesar Robin Troetsth-Guerra, Agustin Troncoso-Delgado, Sandino Eugenio Trotman, Ramon Trotman-Era, Esteban Trotman-Migar, Julio Tugri, Juan Luis Tutimilvo, Gilberto Valdes-Lara, Edgar Valdes-Samudio, Francisco Valdes-Viquez, Marcos Vanegas-Espinosa, Eudocio Vargas-Lezcano, Alcibiades Viquez-Concepcion, Margin Viquez-Gutierrez, Eliecer William-Dugel, Edgar Antonio Aguilar, Benedicto Antonio Aguire-Berganza, Alfonso Aguire-Sandoval, Edgar Ottoniel Agustin, Juan Jose Agustin, Esteban Alarcon-Dorindo, Hector Hernan Alburez, Enio Aldana, Delfiolo Alvarado, Serundino Alvarez, Francisco Javier Alvarez-Castanedo, Ventura Antonio Andino-Vasquez, Victor De Jesus Andrade-Ortega, Edgar Anibal-Martinez, Francisco Aparicio-Garza, Clementino Argueta-Alonzo, Carlos Gabriel Arrue-Perez, Manuel Bacini-Melvin, Jonny Baldomero-Villagram, Rolando Barillas, Juan Francisco Bautista, Nicolas Bojorques, Julian Cabrera, Victor Manuel Carranza-Damazo, Francisco Castaneda-Aguilar, Estanislao Chacon-Morales, Jose Antonio Colindres, Fidel Contreres-Moscoso, Pedro Corado-Pena, Jorge Ernesto Cordon, Julian Crisostomo-Zacarias, Mario Cruz, Saturmino Cruz-Agustin, Antonio De Leon-Rivas, Rigoberto Diaz, Cristobal Diaz-Crisostomo, Edgar Armando Duarte, Javier Moises Duarte, Ramon Rogelio Duarte-Garcia, Manuel Vicente Duarte-Martinez, Carmen Dubon, Alejandro De Jesus Espino-Ramirez, Rolando De Jesus Espino-Ramirez, Eulalio Esquivel-Garcia, Ignacio Figueroa, Ricardo Figueroa, Rodolfo Flamencio, Julio Alberto Galdamez, Jose Reinero Galdamez-Ramos, Valentin Garcia, Jose Manuel Giron-Perez, Eliseo Godoy-Murillo, Carlos Humberto Gomez-Ortiz, Daniel Gonzalez, Nicolas Gonzalez, Rolando Gonzalez-Perez, Rigoberto Gonzalez-Sandoval, Camilo Delis Granillo-Portillo, Obdulio Guerra-Guerra, Jose Herminio Guerra-Sagastume, Alid Humberto-Guevara, Carlos Rodolfo Guevara-Gonzalez, Vicente Arnoldo Gutierrez, Esteban Hernandez, Israel De Jesus Hernandez, Juan Hernandez, Jose Luis Hernandez-Giron, Luis Gilberto Hernandez-Hernandez, Manuel Hernandez-Lopez, Victor Manuel Hernandez-Lopez, Jose Dagoberto Hernandez-Palma, Oscar Obdulio Hernandez-Ramirez, Miguel Angel Hernandez-Velasquez, Esquivel Eduardo Herrera, Jose Lui Interiano-Dubon, Andres Jacinto, Cecilio Jacome, Jose Esteban Jarquin, Lorenzo Juarez, Florencio Juarez-Borja, Jose Rodolfo Juniques, Jose Alirio Lazaro, Concepcion Lazaro-Bautista, Maximiliano Leiva, Esteban Lemus-Agosto, Jorge Roderico Leon-Herandez, Edgar Aroldo Leon-Hernandez, Mariano Lopez, Noe Adelino Lopez, Santiago Lopez, Abraham Lopez-Cortez, Noe Lopez-Dimas, Esteban Lopez-Garcia, Jose Maria Lopez-Martinez, Damaso Lopez-Palma, Edgar Ricardo Luna-Lario, Eduardo Machorro, Oscar Ovidio Madrid, Miguel Angel Madrid-Cardon, Manuel Mansilla-Lopez, Melvin Manuel-Bacini, Manuel Marin-Lopez, Marco Antonio Marroquin, Hector Marroquin-Castaneda, Justo Rufino Marroquin-Marroquin, Cecilio Martinez, Cristobal Martinez, Rodilio Acencio Martinez, Rudy Martinez-Arias, Gregorio De Jesus Martinez-Benett, Luis Martinez-Morales, Ricardo Mejia-Garcia, Herminio Mejia-Miranda, German Isael Mellado-Castro, Alirio Manuel Mendez, Amadeo Mendez, Bernardino Mendez, Juad De Dios Mendez, Samuel Mendez-Ramirez, Esau Mendez-Romero, Pio De Jesus Miguel, Victor Manuel Miguel, Alcides De Jesus Miguel-Hernandez, Jose Alfredo Miguel-Hernandez, Rene Miguel-Martinez, Hector Augusto Miguel-Miguel, Jose Alberto Mijangos-Flores, Ruben Miranda-Condona, Jose Rolando Monroy-Barrientos, Orlando Monroy-Martinez, Diego Monzon, Domingo Monzon, Eliodoro Enrique Morales-Agustin, Miguel Angel Morales-Sanabria, Francisco Morales-Valenzuela, Alfredo Moscoso, Armando Muralles-Contreras, Juan Marco Najera, Rufino Najera, Eriberto De Jesus Najera-Arias, Rufino Najera-Hernandez, Juan Najera-Palma, Pedro Najera-Palma, Juan Najera-Quiroa, Samuel Najera-Quiroa, Edgar Nufio-Orellana, Rene Ovidio Oliva-Sagastume, Oscar Anibal Orellana-Belteton, Tiburcio Orellana-Cruz, Hugo Rene Orellana-Veliz, Elvin Salvador Ortega, Agustin Ortega-Lopez, Israel Ortiz-Zabaleto, Odilio Paiz, Pedro Palacios-Ramos, Teofilo Palencia, Jose Antonio Palencia-Enriquez, Juan Antonio Palencia-Enriquez, Edgar Augusto Palencia-Moscoso, Agapito Palma, Jose Amilcar Palma, Ronald Oswaldo Palma-Esteban, Pedro Palma-Palma, Elfido Roberto Pancan-Sosa, Luces Oveniel Pancan-Sosa, Oscar Humberto Pensamiento-Diaz, Hector Manuel Perez, Jose Arturo Perez, Melvin Manuel Perez, Miguel Angel Perez-De Jesus, Manuel Avelino Perez-Hernandez, Leonel Perez-Lara, Agustin Perez-Lopez, Bernarve Perez-Lopez, Mariano De Jesus Perez-Molina, Neptaly Perez-Perez, Cristobal Perez-Ramirez, Wenceslao Perez-Ramirez, Alfonso Peter-Martinez, Aquilano Pineda-Orellana, Oscar Humberto Pinzon, Marco Tulio Portas-Duarte, Hector Manuel Portillo, Antonio De Jesus Quincin, Cesar Antonio Quincin, Carlos Humberto Quincin-Najera, Salvador De Jesus Quinsin-Nagera, Saul De Maria Quinsin-Najer, Hector Manuel Ramirez, Isidro Ramirez, Lino Ramirez-Amador, Manuel De Jesus Ramirez-Bautista, Juan Antonio Ramirez-Garcia, Jose Ramirez-Leon, Carlos Ramirez-Lopez, Mario Ramirez-Lorenzo, Delfino Ramirez-Miranda, Javier Arnulfo Ramos, Maximiliano Ramos, Rolando Amado Ramos, Silvestre Gilberto Ramos, Gilberto Ramos-Cameros, Jorge Rigoberto Ramos-Fuentes, Abelino Ramos-Luna, Julian Ramos-Soto, Jose Ramos-Vasquez, Antonio Reyes-Cetina, Roberto Reyes-Nunez, Jose Antonio Reyes-Orozco, Alejandro Rivera, Carlos Humberto Rivera, Marco Rivera-Domingo, Jose Alfredo Rodriguez, Ricardo Rodriguez-Donal, Marco Tulis Rodriguez-Morales, Jose Adolfo Rodriguez-Ramos, Andres Rosa, Rigoberto Rosa, Jose Antonio Rosales, Antonio Ruiz, Juana Socono Sagastume-Duarte, Salomon Sagastume-Ruiz, Leonel Alcides Salazar, Rodolfo Salazar, Eduardo Salazar-Bojorques, Marcelo De Maria Salazar-Monroy, Celestino Salvatierra-Ramos, Martiliano Samayoa-Beza, Arnulfo Sanchez, Angel Sanchez-Gonzalez, Santos Sanchez-Hernandez, Victor Santiago-Primero, Osmin Silva-Nunez, Pedro De Jesus Solis, Jacinto Solorzamo-Picon, Jacinto Solorzano-Picon, Carlos Efen Suriano-De Leon, Fredy Rolando Suriano-Vega, Desiderio Tenas-Villeda, Ovidio Tobar-Arroyo, Rafael Tobar-Arroyo, Jorge David Tobar-Loyo, Roel Tovar-Duarte, Alejandro Trigueros-Archila, Raul Che Vargas, Jose Amilcar Vasquez, Enrique Vasquez-Baudilio, Alberto Vasquez-Garcia, Agustin Trinidad Velasquez, Efrain Antonio Velasquez, Mario Fidel Veliz-Orellana, Oscar Otilio Ventura-Gomez, Efrain Antonio Villafuerte, Alejandro De Maria Villafuerte-Lemus, Jose Vidal Villagran-Amaya, Roque Wenceslao-Martinez, Francisco Manuel Yague, Francisco Manuel Yanes-Gomez, Francisca Yaque-Gomez, Julian Zacarias, Miguel Manuel Zanabria, Jorge Ernesto Zavaleta-Aragon, Roger Morante-Atencio and Albino Borjas-Mendez
Defendant: Jose Crisostomo-Sacarias
Petitioner: Eugenio Dolores Ramirez-Roman
Case Number: 1:2012cv00696
Filed: June 1, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: XX Outside US
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2018 CORRECTING ENTRY: The letter filed at D.I. 65 has been removed per counsel's request. As a reminder this case is consolidated with Lead Civil Action 12-695-RGA, and all filings are to be made only in the Lead Civil Action. (nms)
October 31, 2018 Case Reassigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
September 13, 2018 Filing 64 NOTICE of Appearance by Barbara H. Stratton on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Stratton, Barbara)
September 12, 2018 Filing 63 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance of Corinne Elise Amato by Del Monte Fresh Produce N.A. Inc. (Amato, Corinne)
July 31, 2018 Filing 62 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Donald E. Reid regarding Proposed Scheduling Order. (Reid, Donald)
September 22, 2014 Filing 61 FINAL JUDGMENT (see document for more information) (CASE CLOSED). Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/22/14. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-00695-LPS, 1:12-cv-00696-LPS (ntl)
June 18, 2014 Case Reassigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (bkb)
September 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Motion to Dismiss (filed at D.I. 24 in C.A. 12-696-RGA); Denying Motion for a More Definite Statement or to DIsmiss (see D.I. #33 ); and Denying Motion for Dismissal of Claims (see D.I. #35 ) (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/19/2013. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-00695-RGA, 1:12-cv-00696-RGA(nms)
August 19, 2013 CORRECTING ENTRY: The Pro Hac motion filed at D.I. 60 has been removed from the docket as all filings are ONLY to be made in the Lead case Civil Action 12-695-RGA. (nms)
August 16, 2013 Filing 59 NOTICE of Unavailability of Scott Hendler, Esquire by Gonzalo Rodrigo Abad-Castillo (Sensor, Michael)
July 8, 2013 CORRECTING ENTRY: The letter filed at D.I. 59 has been removed from the docket as it was incorrectly filed in the wrong case. (nms)
June 19, 2013 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER: The Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(2) (D.I. 31 in C.A. 12-695-RGA, and D.I. 41 in C.A. 12-696-RGA) is GRANTED for the reasons set forth in C.A. No. 12-697, D.I. 72. A separate order will be entered dismissing Chiquita Brands International, Inc.. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/19/2013. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-00695-RGA, 1:12-cv-00696-RGA(nms)
June 19, 2013 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER: The Motion to Stay (D.I. 30 in C.A. 12-695-RGA, and D.I. 40 in C.A. 12-696-RGA) is DISMISSED AS MOOT in light of the Delaware Supreme Court's ruling in Dow Chemical Corp. v. Blanco, 2013 WL 2474688 (Del. June 10, 2013). Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/19/2013. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-00695-RGA, 1:12-cv-00696-RGA(nms)
January 16, 2013 CORRECTING ENTRY: The Joinded filed at D.I. 59 has been removed from the docket. Pursuant to D.I. #58 all filings only need be docketed in CA 12-695-RGA. (nms)
November 29, 2012 Remark: Per the entry of D.I. 48 in 12cv695-RGA, and D.I. 58 in 12cv696-RGA, Civil Action 12-695-RGA has been designated the lead case for all future filings. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-00695-RGA, 1:12-cv-00696-RGA(nms)
November 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 58 SO ORDERED Granting (57 in 1:12-cv-00696-RGA, and 47 in 1:12-cv-00695-RGA) Stipulation Regarding Joinder of Certain Cases, filed by Standard Fruit Company, Dole Fresh Fruit Co., Dole Food Company Inc., Standard Fruit and Steamship Company. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/29/2012. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-00695-RGA, 1:12-cv-00696-RGA(nms)
November 29, 2012 Filing 57 STIPULATION re Joinder of Certain Cases, by Dole Food Company Inc., Dole Fresh Fruit Co., Standard Fruit Company, Standard Fruit and Steamship Company. (Attachments: #1 Letter)(Price, Somers) Modified on 11/29/2012 (nms).
November 28, 2012 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Laura Schut for Chiquita Brands International Inc., Samuel E. Stubbs for Chiquita Brands International Inc., R. Jack Reynolds for Chiquita Brands International Inc., added for electronic noticing. (dmp, )
November 26, 2012 Filing 56 REPLY BRIEF re #40 MOTION to Stay, filed by Gonzalo Rodrigo Abad-Castillo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Sensor, Michael) Modified on 11/27/2012 (nms).
November 14, 2012 Filing 55 JOINDER by AMVAC Chemical Corporation, joining in #50 Answering Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Stay. (Phillips, John) Modified on 11/14/2012 (nms).
November 13, 2012 Filing 54 RESPONSE to #40 MOTION to Stay Pending Delaware Supreme Court Decision on Cross-Jurisdictional Tolling, filed by Shell Oil Company. (Farnan, Kelly) Modified on 11/14/2012 (nms).
November 13, 2012 Filing 53 RESPONSE to #40 MOTION to Stay Pending Delaware Supreme Court Decision on Cross-Jurisdictional Tolling, filed by Dole Food Company Inc., Dole Fresh Fruit Co., Standard Fruit Company, Standard Fruit and Steamship Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Price, Somers) Modified on 11/14/2012 (nms).
November 13, 2012 Filing 52 JOINDER by Del Monte Fresh Produce N.A. Inc., joining in #50 Answering Brief in Opposition to #40 Motion to Stay. (Amato, Corinne) Modified on 11/14/2012 (nms).
November 13, 2012 Filing 51 JOINDER by Occidental Chemical Corporation, joining in #50 Answering Brief in Opposition. (Kinkus, Jennifer) Modified on 11/14/2012 (nms).
November 13, 2012 Filing 50 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #40 MOTION to Stay Pending Delaware Supreme Court Decision on Cross-Jurisdictional Tolling filed by Dow Chemical Company.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 11/26/2012. (Reid, Donald)
November 13, 2012 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (45 in 1:12-cv-00701-RGA, 45 in 1:12-cv-00700-RGA, 45 in 1:12-cv-00697-RGA, 45 in 1:12-cv-00699-RGA, 45 in 1:12-cv-00702-RGA, 45 in 1:12-cv-00698-RGA, 49 in 1:12-cv-00696-RGA, 39 in 1:12-cv-00695-RGA) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to RESPOND to Motions to Dismiss to 12/17/2012, and 1/14/2013, filed by Guzman Castro Epifano, Frederico Salinas Jimenez, Jacinto Martinez Ibarra, Heris Geovanny Malla Lopez, Luis Alberto Pesantez Redrovan, Daniel Serrano Chito, Luis Antonio Aguilar Marquinez. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/13/2012. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-00695-RGA et al.(nms)
November 12, 2012 Filing 49 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to RESPOND to Chiquita's 12(b) Motion to Dismiss to 12/17/2012 - filed by Gonzalo Rodrigo Abad-Castillo. (Sensor, Michael)
November 9, 2012 Filing 48 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL re Del Monte Fresh Produce N.A. Inc.: Entry of appearance of attorney Corinne Elise Amato. Attorney Jody C. Barillare terminated. (Amato, Corinne)
November 2, 2012 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (43 in 1:12-cv-00699-RGA, 43 in 1:12-cv-00701-RGA, 47 in 1:12-cv-00696-RGA, 43 in 1:12-cv-00702-RGA, 43 in 1:12-cv-00697-RGA, 43 in 1:12-cv-00700-RGA, 37 in 1:12-cv-00695-RGA, 43 in 1:12-cv-00698-RGA) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney R. Jack Reynolds, Samuel E. Stubbs and Laura E. Schut filed by Chiquita Fresh North America LLC, Chiquita Brands International Inc., Chiquita Brands LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/2/2012. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-00695-RGA et al.(nms)
November 2, 2012 Filing 47 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney R. Jack Reynolds, Samuel E. Stubbs and Laura E. Schut - filed by Chiquita Brands International Inc., Chiquita Brands LLC, Chiquita Fresh North America LLC(individually and as). (Attachments: #1 Certification of R. Jack Reynolds, #2 Certification of Samuel Stubbs, #3 Certification of Laura Schut, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Caponi, Steven)
October 26, 2012 Filing 46 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #45 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Statute of Limitations filed by Chiquita Brands International Inc., Chiquita Brands LLC, Chiquita Fresh North America LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 11/13/2012. (Caponi, Steven)
October 26, 2012 Filing 45 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Statute of Limitations - filed by Chiquita Brands International Inc., Chiquita Brands LLC, Chiquita Fresh North America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Motion, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Caponi, Steven)
October 26, 2012 Filing 44 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #43 MOTION for More Definite Statement Pursuant to Rule 12(e) or, in the alternative, to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Chiquita Brands International Inc., Chiquita Brands LLC, Chiquita Fresh North America LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 11/13/2012. (Caponi, Steven)
October 26, 2012 Filing 43 MOTION for More Definite Statement Pursuant to Rule 12(e) or, in the alternative, to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) - filed by Chiquita Brands International Inc., Chiquita Brands LLC, Chiquita Fresh North America LLC(individually and as). (Attachments: #1 Notice of Motion, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Caponi, Steven)
October 26, 2012 Filing 42 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #41 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule (12)(b)(2), filed by Chiquita Brands International Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 11/13/2012. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Caponi, Steven) Modified on 10/26/2012 (nms).
October 26, 2012 Filing 41 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule (12)(b)(2) - filed by Chiquita Brands International Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Motion, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Caponi, Steven) Modified on 10/26/2012 (nms).
October 25, 2012 Remark: Set Answering Brief Deadline re(40 in 1:12-cv-00696-RGA, 36 in 1:12-cv-00700-RGA, 36 in 1:12-cv-00697-RGA, 36 in 1:12-cv-00702-RGA, 36 in 1:12-cv-00701-RGA, 36 in 1:12-cv-00698-RGA, 36 in 1:12-cv-00699-RGA, 30 in 1:12-cv-00695-RGA) MOTION to Stay Pending Delaware Supreme Court Decision on Cross-Jurisdictional Tolling. Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 11/13/2012. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-00695-RGA et al. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-00695-RGA et al.(nms)
October 24, 2012 Filing 40 MOTION to Stay Pending Delaware Supreme Court Decision on Cross-Jurisdictional Tolling - filed by Gonzalo Rodrigo Abad-Castillo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Proposed Order)(Sensor, Michael) Modified on 10/24/2012 (nms).
October 22, 2012 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #39 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint to October 26, 2012, filed by Chiquita Brands International Inc., Chiquita Brands LLC (Reset Answer Deadlines: Chiquita Brands International Inc. answer due 10/26/2012; Chiquita Brands LLC answer due 10/26/2012; Chiquita Fresh North America LLC answer due 10/26/2012; Chiquita Fresh North America LLC(individually and as) answer due 10/26/2012). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/22/2012. (nms)
October 22, 2012 Filing 39 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint to October 26, 2012 - filed by Chiquita Brands International Inc., Chiquita Brands LLC. (Caponi, Steven)
September 28, 2012 Filing 38 NOTICE of Defendant Occidental Chemical Corporation in Defendant Dole Food Company, Inc., Dole Fresh Fruit Company, Standard Fruit Company, and Standard Fruit and Steamship Company's Joinder in the Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to the First Filed Rule - filed by Occidental Chemical Corporation. (Houseal, Timothy) Modified on 10/1/2012 (nms).
September 28, 2012 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #37 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint to October 22, 2012, filed by Chiquita Fresh North America LLC, Chiquita Brands International Inc., Chiquita Brands LLC, (Reset Answer Deadlines: Chiquita Brands International Inc. answer due 10/22/2012; Chiquita Brands LLC answer due 10/22/2012; Chiquita Fresh North America LLC answer due 10/22/2012). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/28/2012. (nms)
September 28, 2012 Filing 37 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint to October 22, 2012 - filed by Chiquita Brands International Inc., Chiquita Brands LLC, Chiquita Fresh North America LLC. (Caponi, Steven)
September 28, 2012 CORRECTING ENTRY: The second part of the Compendium of Unreported cases filed at D.I. 37 has been removed from the docket. The PDF for that filing has been added to the Compendium filed at D.I. #36 . (nms)
September 27, 2012 Filing 36 Compendium of Unreported Decisions re #35 Reply Brief, Part 1 of 2 - tabs 1 - 4 by Dole Food Company Inc., Dole Fresh Fruit Co., Standard Fruit Company, Standard Fruit and Steamship Company. (Price, Somers) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/28/2012: #1 Tabs 5-8) (nms).
September 27, 2012 Filing 35 REPLY BRIEF re #24 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon First Filed Rule filed by Dole Food Company Inc., Dole Fresh Fruit Co., Standard Fruit Company, Standard Fruit and Steamship Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Exhibit A)(Price, Somers)
September 21, 2012 Filing 34 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand, by Del Monte Fresh Produce N.A. Inc..(Semple, James) Modified on 9/21/2012 (nms).
September 17, 2012 Filing 33 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by AMVAC Chemical Corporation.(Phillips, John) Modified on 9/21/2012 (nms).
September 17, 2012 Filing 32 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #24 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon First Filed Rule filed by Gonzalo Rodrigo Abad-Castillo.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 9/27/2012. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Sensor, Michael)
September 13, 2012 Filing 31 JOINDER by Shell Oil Company, joining in #24 Motion to Dismiss. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Farnan, Kelly) Modified on 9/13/2012 (nms).
September 6, 2012 Filing 30 JOINDER by AMVAC Chemical Corporation, joining in #24 Motion to Dismiss. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Proposed Order)(Phillips, John) Modified on 9/9/2012 (nms).
September 5, 2012 Filing 29 JOINDER by Dow Chemical Company, joining in #24 Motion to Dismiss, Pursuant To The First-Filed Rule. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reid, Donald)
September 5, 2012 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #18 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME date by which Defendant must answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint to September 21, 2012, filed by Del Monte Fresh Produce N.A. Inc. (Reset Answer Deadlines: Del Monte Fresh Produce N.A. Inc. answer due 9/21/2012). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/5/2012. (nms)
September 5, 2012 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #19 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Complaint to 09/14/2012, filed by AMVAC Chemical Corporation (Reset Answer Deadlines: AMVAC Chemical Corporation answer due 9/14/2012). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/5/2012. (nms)
September 5, 2012 Filing 28 JOINDER by Occidental Chemical Corporation, joining in #24 Motion to Dismiss. (Kinkus, Jennifer) Modified on 9/5/2012 (nms).
August 31, 2012 Filing 27 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand by Dole Food Company Inc., Dole Fresh Fruit Co., Standard Fruit Company, Standard Fruit and Steamship Company.(Price, Somers)
August 31, 2012 Filing 26 MEMORANDUM in Support re #24 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon First Filed Rule filed by Dole Food Company Inc., Dole Fresh Fruit Co., Standard Fruit Company, Standard Fruit and Steamship Company.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 9/17/2012. (Attachments: #1 certificate of service)(Price, Somers)
August 31, 2012 Filing 25 Certification of Counsel re #24 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon First Filed Rule, by Dole Food Company Inc., Dole Fresh Fruit Co., Standard Fruit Company, Standard Fruit and Steamship Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit)(Price, Somers) Modified on 9/5/2012 (nms).
August 31, 2012 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon First Filed Rule - filed by Dole Food Company Inc., Dole Fresh Fruit Co., Delfo Esteban Reyes-Laso, Standard Fruit Company, Standard Fruit and Steamship Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Price, Somers)
August 31, 2012 Filing 23 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Shell Oil Company identifying Corporate Parent Royal Dutch Shell PLC for Shell Oil Company.. (Farnan, Kelly)
August 31, 2012 Filing 22 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand by Shell Oil Company.(Farnan, Kelly)
August 31, 2012 Filing 21 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by The Dow Chemical Company. (Reid, Donald)
August 31, 2012 Filing 20 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with JURY DEMAND by The Dow Chemical Company.(Reid, Donald)
August 31, 2012 Filing 19 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Complaint to 09/14/2012 - filed by AMVAC Chemical Corporation. (Phillips, John)
August 31, 2012 Filing 18 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME date by which Defendant must answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint to September 21, 2012 - filed by Del Monte Fresh Produce N.A. Inc.. (Barillare, Jody)
August 30, 2012 CORRECTING ENTRY: The Clerk's Office added the pdf document to DI# 17 and regenerated the NEF to counsel. (rwc)
August 30, 2012 Filing 17 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Del Monte Fresh Produce N.A. Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Fresh Del Monte Produce Inc. for Del Monte Fresh Produce N.A. Inc. (rwc) (rwc).
August 30, 2012 Filing 16 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Occidental Chemical Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Occidental Petroleum Corporation for Occidental Chemical Corporation.. (Kinkus, Jennifer)
August 30, 2012 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Occidental Chemical Corporation.(Kinkus, Jennifer) Modified on 8/31/2012 (nms).
August 16, 2012 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (20 in 1:12-cv-00702-RGA) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jonathan Massey filed by Gonzalez Araya Franklin, (20 in 1:12-cv-00701-RGA) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jonathan Massey filed by Edwin Aguero Jimenez, (20 in 1:12-cv-00699-RGA) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jonathan Massey filed by Alvarado Alfarfo Miguel Francisco, (20 in 1:12-cv-00700-RGA) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jonathan Massey filed by Jorge Luis Aguilar Mora, (14 in 1:12-cv-00696-RGA) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jonathan Massey filed by Gonzalo Rodrigo Abad-Castillo, (20 in 1:12-cv-00697-RGA) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jonathan Massey filed by Tobias Bermudez Chavez, (20 in 1:12-cv-00698-RGA) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jonathan Massey filed by Julio Abrego Abrego, (13 in 1:12-cv-00695-RGA) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jonathan Massey filed by Luis Antonio Aguilar Marquinez. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/16/2012. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-00695-RGA et al.(nms)
August 15, 2012 Filing 14 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jonathan Massey - filed by Gonzalo Rodrigo Abad-Castillo. (Sensor, Michael)
August 9, 2012 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Michael L. Brem for Dow Chemical Company, added for electronic noticing. (dmp, )
August 9, 2012 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Jay Houseal on behalf of Occidental Chemical Corporation (Houseal, Timothy)
August 6, 2012 Filing 12 NOTICE of Unavailability of Scott Hendler for August 2012 by Gonzalo Rodrigo Abad-Castillo (Sensor, Michael)
August 3, 2012 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by John C. Phillips, Jr on behalf of AMVAC Chemical Corporation (Phillips, John)
August 2, 2012 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael L. Brem filed by Dow Chemical Company. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/2/2012. (nms)
August 1, 2012 Filing 10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael L. Brem - filed by Dow Chemical Company. (Reid, Donald)
August 1, 2012 Reset Answer Deadlines: Dow Chemical Company answer due 8/31/2012. (nms)
August 1, 2012 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Dole Food Company Inc., Dole Fresh Fruit Co.: For Dole Food Company Inc. waiver sent on 7/2/2012, answer due 8/31/2012; Dole Fresh Fruit Co. waiver sent on 7/2/2012, answer due 8/31/2012. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Price, Somers)
August 1, 2012 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Standard Fruit Company, Standard Fruit and Steamship Company: For Standard Fruit Company waiver sent on 7/2/2012, answer due 8/31/2012; Standard Fruit and Steamship Company waiver sent on 7/2/2012, answer due 8/31/2012. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Price, Somers)
August 1, 2012 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Gonzalo Rodrigo Abad-Castillo: For Occidental Chemical Corporation waiver sent on 7/2/2012, answer due 8/31/2012. (Sensor, Michael)
August 1, 2012 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Gonzalo Rodrigo Abad-Castillo: For AMVAC Chemical Corporation waiver sent on 7/2/2012, answer due 8/31/2012. (Sensor, Michael)
July 31, 2012 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by The Dow Chemical Company: For The Dow Chemical Company waiver sent on 7/31/2012, answer due 10/1/2012. (Reid, Donald)
July 31, 2012 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald E. Reid on behalf of The Dow Chemical Company (Reid, Donald)
July 5, 2012 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Scott M. Hendler for Gonzalo Rodrigo Abad-Castillo, added for electronic noticing. (dmp, )
June 29, 2012 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #3 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Scott M. Hendler, Esquire filed by Ronald Araya-Zuniga, Aparacio Morales-Carranza, Guillermo Javier Valarezo-Vega, Angel Miguel Montoya-Velez, Faustino Quesada-Valladares, Luis Angel Quito-Nieves, Pedro Concepcion Izurieta-Morocho, Jose Alejandro Baque, Luis Dionicio Vasquez-Mateo, Amada Justo Villacis-Bermeo, Victor Manuel Palta-Pasazo, Marino Bermudez-Arias, Martin Bonilla-Jimenez, Omar Barrantes-Esquivel, Vitaliano Granda, Arturo Guillermo Munoz, Julian Ramos-Soto, Rigoberto Diaz, Miguel Loria-Mora, Rolando Sagot-Arias, Lorenzo Ramirez-Honorato, Segundo Mariano Ayllon-Mejia, Bolivar Caballero-Herrera, Alejandro Gonzalo Aguilar-Carreno, Aurelio Ernesto Vera-Zerna, Nautillio Elizondo-Arias, Pedro Armando Castillo-Vargas, Francisco Guerra E., Codme D. Naranjo-Murillo, Marcos Martinez-Asencio, Jacinto Alipio Zambrano-Leon, Julio Benavides-Castillo, Manuel Navarro-Morales, Efrain Vargas-Mejia, Luis Eduardo Munoz-Morocho, Alejandro De Maria Villafuerte-Lemus, Mauro Falcones-Medranda, Amable Calero, Jose Vicente Sancho-Sumba, Alvaro Carranza-Sanchez, Rafael Angel Velasquez-Zamora, Jorge Cespedes-Montoya, Julian Evans-Trotman, Nelson Martinez-Concepcion, Cesar Julio Gomez-Godoy, Diogenes Sanchez-Oyala, Segundo Aquilino Criollo-Luzuriaga, Zacarias Castillo-Vargas, Cesar Humberto Sumba-Marin, Concepcion Lazaro-Bautista, Alfredo Alvarado-Rodriguez, Ramon Castillo-Garay, Roger Rios-Sanchez, Santos Clemente-Juan, Rodolfo Guillermo Gutierrez, Jose Maria Lopez-Vera, Victor Manuel Aguas-Salazar, Ramon Francisco Vega-Zamora, Enriquez Erazmo Calle-Fernandez, Julio Cesar Jaramillo-Lalvay, Juan Francisco Cisneros-Infante, Miguel Angel Quichimbo-Arias, Cesar Robin-Troetsth, Jose Maria Loja, Jorge Caiza-M., Harnelio De Jesus Ordonez-Salinas, Julio Ramon Vera-Sandoval, Fulvio Arauz-Viquez, Jose Braulio Cerezo-Jaramillo, Custodio Lopez-Campos, Luis Cesar Pilhco, Adrian Cascante-Vargas, Pedro Alberto Vasquez-Mateo, Wilson Bolivar Suarez, Luis Enrique Rodriguez-Monserrate, Fernando Calle-Bolivar, Orlando Sojo-Cerdas, Efrain Eulogio Padilla-Serrano, Victor Emiliano Maita-Capa, German Campos-Monge, Luis Alberto Paquerizo-Cordero, Javier Moises Duarte, Cesar Alberto Pacheco-Llivicura, Jose Maximo Victor-Lindao, Luis Guillermo Vasquez-Brenes, Luis Abdon Suarez-Dominguez, Chiquita Brands LLC, Miguel Fernandez-Brisuela, Jose Amilcar Vascquez, Franklin Eustorgio Zambrano-Intriago, Machado Serrano-Chito, Benicio Corella-Mora, Raul Arturo Ordonez-Ordonez, Alberto Santos-Flores, Claro Cesareo Sandoval-Almeida, Luis Nazareno-Mina, Francisco Silvero Garcia-Tenorio, Abel Garcia-Garcia, Jose Guido Guaicha-Cardenas, Gilberto Ramos-Cameros, Lorenzo Juarez, Plutarco Cardenas-Lopez, Salustino Jose Serrano-Perez, Jose Manuel Yacurancela-Llivisaca, Juan Castillo-Castillo, Mario Ramirez-Lorenzo, Celestino Abrego-Chopa, Oliverio Rodriguez-Alpizar, Rafael Angel Quesada-Arguedas, Nelson Eduardo Villacis-Montenegro, Cesar Agusto Quituizaca-Matailo, Luis Enrique Arevalo-Penarrosa, Jose Armando Paizano-Levy, Segundo Belisario Centeno-Centeno, Hilario Aurelio Minuche-Noriega, Carlos Vicente Bayas-Palacios, Rodrigo Ramon Soltos-Cedeno, Manuel Timoteo Orellana-Fares, Claudio Fernando Esmeraldas-Velez, Rogelio Cedeno-Gomez, Marvin Salazar-Murillo, Trinidad Valentin Moreno-Vargas, Cesar Antono Carchi-Barrezueta, Carlos Gabriel Arrue-Perez, Jose Lautaro Narvaez-Benitez, Dionicio Abrahan Gutierrez-Sanchez, Luis Antonio Lozano-Bony, Jose Mariano Ajila, Ronald Oswaldo Palma-Esteban, Jose Norberto Ordonez-Ordonez, Cesar Augusto Rodriguez-Suarez, Victor Willian Contreras-Contreras, Luis Efrain Sanchez-Chuva, Andres Jacinto, Melvin Manuel-Bacini, Ambrosio Medina-Medina, Pedro Abrego-Ocho, Carlos Hernandez-Leon, Luis Ernesto Quichimbo-Arias, Mesias Luis Jadan-Dominguez, Farid Duarte-Mendoza, Jose Rosendo Leon-Leon, Isidro Ramirez, Urbano Juan Rosario-Avelino, Jorge Suarez-Morales, Guillermo Nicanor Lozano-Cabrera, Victor Ricardo Loja, Manuel Lopez-Valencia, Miguel Angel Leon-Leon, Segundo Virgilio Neira-Piedra, Tomas Gutierrez-Gutierrez, Juan Angel Dominguez-Mateos, Felix Martin Silva-Quinones, Sergio Hugo Loyola, Leonardo Leon-Fernandez, Fernando Perez-Fallas, Angel Segundo Loja-Pugo, Justo Enrique Medina-Munoz, Manuel Roberto Deleg-Guncay, Juvenal Ortiz-Roman, Luis Manuel Morocho-Tituana, Luis Tarquino Salinas-Macao, Rene Miguel-Martinez, Dativo Rios-Santamaria, Nicolas Salguero-Franco, Meybol Jesus Ulloa-Villacres, Eugenio Amado Jara-Casquete, Sixto Bolivar Flores-Vaca, Jose Maria San Martin-Belesaca, Gustavo Rene Espinoza-Espinoza, Samuel Najera-Quiroa, Rigoberto Ramirez-Santamaria, Bartolo Baudillo Diaz-Campuzano, Daniel Clever Nieves-Huarga, Jose Adalberto Arevalo-Erreyes, Luces Oveniel Pancan-Sosa, Manuel Antonio Mingo-Peralta, Custodio Agruedas-Saenz, Pedro Wilfredo Teran-Jara, Gilberto Elias Gonzalez, Mario Badilla-Gonzalez, Miguel A. Salazar, Medardo Seferino Niola-Pena, Eduardo Quiroz, Juan Rodolfo Rojas-Alfaro, Juan Luis Lanon-Preciado, Angel Wilfrido Cardenas-Centero, Jose Angel Sequeira-Villegas, Jorge Sarin, Gonzalo Rodrigo Duran-Madriz, Maximo Vilella Reto-Olaya, Manuel De Jesus Gorazabel-Pazmino, Jose Santo Mendoza-Munoz, Luciano Pardo Gonzabay-Dominguez, Juan Ramon Fernandez-Salazar, Jose Manuel Loja-Chuque, Virgilio Homero Gomez-Martinez, Jose Esteban Jarquin, Flavio Isas Bravo-Palma, Francisco Valverde-Gomez, Manuel Vera, Luis Gerardo Nivelo-Cajamarca, Manuel Antonio Cueva-Jimenez, Manuel Rodrigo Morocho-Farez, Leonardo Medina-Naranjo, Humberto Caballero-Flores, Freddy Dante Gutierrez, Agustin Troncoso-Delgado, Carlos Luis Montero-Calderon, Esteban Herrera-De Gracia, Domingo Martinez-Morales, Wellington Ismael Torres-Chica, Rafael Cecilio. Valderramos-Bermuda, Manuel Ricardo Duche-Velez, Martin Jimenez-Caballero, Froylan Baltodano-Grijalba, Alfredo Rodolfo Quinto-Palacios, German Aquiles Garcia-Mendoza, Edwin Oswaldo Mora-Naula, Fernando Lezama-Lezama, Jorge Enrique Cherrez-Carrion, Fausto Sandoval-Solano, Abelardo Ojeda-Carrion, Guillermo Santos-Quintero, Ramon Arana-Araya, Julio Segundo Bohorquez-Gomez, Wilbert Gregorio Jimenez-Badilla, Fred Allete-Clark, Francisco Cristobal Lucas-Del Rosario, Claro Jesus Lara-Casquete, Prospero Lopez-Leon, Antonio Reyes-Cetina, Jose Oswaldo Mendez-Cabanilla, Klever Alberto Benitez-Ruiz, Jose Hipolito Flores-Coello, Carlos Sanchez-Roman, Jose Juaquin Delgado-Ramirez, Manuel Simon Reyes-Martinez, Serundino Alvarez, Antonio Zuniga-Solano, Efrain Sacarias Leon-Bermeo, Oscar Humberto Pinzon, Marlon Alberto Miranda-Medrano, Jose I. Bolano-Espinoza, Pablo Nelson Nieto-Peralta, Manuel Mesias Sanchez-Arica, Jose Rogelio Carrion, Jose Gerardo Villalobos-Artavia, Fausto Rigoberto Belmuda-Morocho, Wilian Benito Mora-Dominguez, Carlos Rodalfo Guevara-Gonzalez, Manuel Agustin Cordova-Granda, Maximo Eli Cordova-Granda, Enrique Gonzalo Poma-Jimbo, Melvin Manuel Perez, Fausto Isabel Rangel-Roman, Luis Fernando Mora-Almeida, Alejandro De Jesus Espino-Ramirez, Ernesto Quintero-Quintero, Jose Segundo Pinargote-Mera, Arturo Franco-Intriago, Luis Mariano Vasquez-Vasquez, Chiquita Brands International Inc., Julio Cesar Cruz-Perez, Domingo Machado-Flores, Marcos Vidal Suarez-Del Rosario, Miguel Arsello Fajardo-Quezada, Alberto Vasquez-Garcia, Alcibiades Alvarado-Pimentel, Esteban Modesto Riofrio-Acosta, Porfiro Rolando Lucero-Azansa, Angel F. Cabrera-Corte, Joel Eustorgio Telcan-Lopez, Jose Cristobal Montero-Quezada, Jose Clemente Pilay-Lindao, Bolivar Antonio Penarreta-Jimenez, Santos Tomas Loayza-Mendoza, Alexis Chavez-Morales, Luis David Tigre-Lucero, Luis Guillermo Sagbay, Jose Humberto Flores-Quijije, Victor Hugo Criollo-Poglio, Leonardo Vicente Paladines, Jesus Tarcisco Songuirimo-Tenepaguay, Margin Viquez-Gutierrez, Jorge Guzman-Obando, Marco Tulio Portas-Duarte, Carlos Hernan Rugel-Carpio, Jose Fajardo-Candelario, Luis Humberto Pulla-Penaranda, Luis Victor Sarango, Olmedo Audencio Sandoval-Almeida, Heraldo Armando Giron-Reto, Jose Palacio-Nicho, Luis Alberto Reyes-Parrales, Tomas Humberto Bravo-Bravo, Osvaldo Ruiz-Valdez, Hipolito Arnulfo Pena-Espinosa, Cephas Vactor Mc Carthy-Vactor, Arturo Lorenzo Conrejo-Leon, Angel Polibio Cardenas-Deleg, Addon Arturo Guzman-Abril, Heraldo Bernabe Armijos-Enriquez, Pedro Virgilio Requena-Eugenio, Juan Sabino Silvestre-Lucin, Jose Rosas Quezada-Jordan, Miguel Angel Morales-Sanabria, Marcos Vega-Zamora, Virgilio Rodriguez-Moran, Nicolas Gonzalez, Mario Pineda, Pedro Jose Nieves-Infante, Marvin Segura-Castro, Severo Marchena-Jimenez, Odilio Paiz, Lucas Guillermo Palacios-Cerda, Dimas Bernabe Ortega-Romero, Guillermo Espinoza-Herrera, Victor Luis Pereira-Herrera, Jonny Baldomero-Villagram, German Israel Aguirre-Sanchez, Jorge Luis Solano-Menestel, Antonio Felix Mejia, Heriberto Rueda-Cedeno, Dominguez Basilio Toalongo-Lindao, Segundo Alvarez, Eladio Campos-Sanchez, Luis Felipe Zantana-Mendoza, Vicente Dario Olaya-Palacios, Luis Anibal Herrera-Leon, Juan Evangelista Ochoa-Sanchez, Jorge Trejos-Trejos, Angel Adolfo Zumba-Sinche, Alejandro Vidal Achundia-Bajana, Luis Alfredo Morocho, Paulino Ricardo Gamboa-Velasquez, Ines Morales-Medina, Pedro Felipe Hawking-Jimenez, Cayetano Soto-Cordero, Pedro Pablo Requenes-Requenes, Mario Olman Lopez-Salazar, Roman Cedeno-Cruz, Angel Servio Ortega-Ortega, Antonio Moranga-Ponce, Jose Maria Gutierrez-Matarrita, Urbino Rodriguez-Jara, Miguel Angel Sumba-Sumba, Luis Enrique Ordonez-Ortega, Luis Enrique Navarro-Morales, Quezada Hugo San-Martin, Pedro De Jesus Solis, Alonso Samaniego-Perez, Cesar Julio Maquencia-Burbano, Jeronimo Cordero-Araya, Fausto Daniel Garces-Torres, Manuel Salvador Cajina-Aranda, Luis Gilberto Hernandez-Hernandez, Manuel Juan Tigre-Deleg, Efrain Villamar Pineda-Rivas, Vicente Marcelino De La A Villon, Nicolas Cesario Baldeon-Espinioza, Luis Humberto Pulla-Pulla, Ricardo Vargas-Arguedas, Flor Edgar Gonzalez-Sanchez, Porfirio Pena-Gonzalea, Santiago Gorotiza-Borbor, Manuel Morera-Diaz, Rafael Maria Figre-Figre, Alfredo Perez-Trejos, Jesus David Lota-Abril, Felix Nery Cedeno-Leon, Rafael Corella-Mora, Froilan Caraguay-Arevalo, Rufino Najera-Hernandez, Neptaly Perez-Perez, Jose Andres Eugenio-Ramirez, Artemio Aurelio Mol
June 29, 2012 Filing 3 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Scott M. Hendler, Esquire - filed by Gonzalo Rodrigo Abad-Castillo, Jesus Abad-Manuel, Carlos Luis Abarca-Abarca, Gerardo Aurelio Abarca-Urena, Ricardo Abrego-A., Alejandro Abrego-Abrego, Andres Abrego-Abrego, Fernando Abrego-Abrego, Ignacio Abrego-Abrego, Roberto Abrego-Abrego, Federico Abrego-Beker, Martin Abrego-Beker, Martin Abrego-Castillo, Luis Abrego-Chi, Arturo Abrego-Chico, Valentin Abrego-Chico, Gavino Abrego-Chiro, Chale Abrego-Choba, Celestino Abrego-Chopa, Bentura Abrego-Chuto, Emiliano Abrego-Garay, Antonio Abrego-Ichi, Marchena Abrego-Ichi, Martin Abrego-Miranda, Jaime Abrego-Nico, Pedro Abrego-Ocho, Cornelio Abrego-Sandoya, Florentino Abrego-Santos, Benancio Abrego-Tico, Nicolas Abrigo-Nico, Maximo Angel Acensio-Morales, Alejandro Vidal Achundia-Bajana, Oscar Marcelo Acosta-Lozano, Leopoldo Acosta-Ochoa, Manuel Acosta-Samudio, Manuel Ignacio Acosta-Tamayo, Marcos Rafael Acosta-Vasquez, Custodio Agruedas-Saenz, Victor Manuel Aguas-Salazar, Carlos Virjilio Aguas-Vinueza, Francisco Aguero-Aguero, Edgar Antonio Aguilar, Lauro Aguilar-Aguero, Manuel Elias Aguilar-Aguilar, Alejandro Gonzalo Aguilar-Carreno, Vladimir Aguilar-Mora, Angel Aguilar-Quiros, Luis Vicente Aguilar-Sotambo, Juan Rogelio Aguilar-Valarezo, Carlos Enrique Aguiluz-Cortez, Benedicto Antonio Aguire-Berganza, Alfonso Aguire-Sandoval, Carlos Antonio Aguirre, Enrique Oswaldo Aguirre-Ayala, Luis Antonio Aguirre-Briones, German Israel Aguirre-Sanchez, Juan Eriberto Agurto-Ortega, Edgar Ottoniel Agustin, Juan Jose Agustin, Marin Juan Agustin, Cornelio Aguzzi-Cantillo, Jose Mariano Ajila, Esteban Alarcon-Dorindo, Juan Alavarez-Alvarez, Hector Hernan Alburez, Carlos Alberto Alburqueque-Erazo, Enio Aldana, Issac Alexander-P, Trinidad Alfaro-Mena, Fred Allete-Clark, Leonardo Desiderio Almeida, Wilson Eugenio Almeida-Roman, Delfiolo Alvarado, Victor Alvarado-Erazo, Jose Antonio Alvarado-H, Marcires Alvarado-Lucio, Alcibiades Alvarado-Pimentel, Luis Jonas Alvarado-Ramirez, Simon Augusto Alvarado-Ramirez, Ademar Alvarado-Rodriguez, Alfredo Alvarado-Rodriguez, Jaime Alvarado-Rodriguez, Miguel Angel Alvarado-Ulloa, Segundo Alvarez, Serundino Alvarez, Jose Anibal Alvarez-Calva, Francisco Javier Alvarez-Castanedo, Alfredo Francisco Alvarez-Chica, Cesar Byron Alvarez-Enriquez, Daniel Alvarez-Guerrero, Rafael Alvarez-Perez, Diogenes Anchia-Martinez, Alejandro Vidal Anchundia-Bajana, Ventura Antonio Andino-Vasquez, Victor De Jesus Andrade-Ortega, Edgar Anibal-Martinez, Francisco Aparicio-Garza, Juan Francisco Apunte-Bustos, Jose Miguel Aragundi-Bijay, Ramon Arana-Araya, Edinson Enrique Araujo-Carreno, Robert Alejandro Araujo-Pizarro, Felix Dimas Arauz-Atencio, Onesimo Arauz-Cortez, Feliciano Arauz-Guerra, Porfirio Arauz-Quintero, Celso Arauz-Sanchez, Fulvio Arauz-Viquez, Jose Angel Araya-Bolanos, Roney Araya-Garcia, Hugo Araya-Mora, Miguel Antonio Araya-Vargas, Ronald Araya-Zuniga, Jose Luis Arce-Castro, Lorenzo Arcia-Morales, Jose Adalberto Arevalo-Erreyes, Luis Enrique Arevalo-Penarrosa, Rigoberto Gerardo Arguedas-Bolanos, Ernesto Gerardo Arguedas-Fernandez, Luis Miguel Arguello-Albarracin, Clementino Argueta-Alonzo, Juan Rafael Arias-Arroyo, Palacio Arias-Chupa, Tarsicio Arias-Fonseca, Adan Levi Arias-Gonzalez, Angel Arias-Jiminez, Edwin Arias-Meza, Trino Arias-Meza, Enclides Ezequiel Arias-Morales, Heriberto Arias-Rodriguez, Bienvenido Arias-Solano, Gerardo Arias-Solano, Victor Manuel Arias-Solano, Marvin Arias-Vargas, Felix Alberto Arica-Cedillo, Frutoso Elizardo Arica-Chica, Pedro Antonio Arica-Gomez, Octavio Arjona-Rodriguez, Juan Delio Armijos-Cabrera, Heraldo Bernabe Armijos-Enriquez, Segundo Alcides Armijos-Pesantes, Holger Galindo Armijos-Romero, Angel Polivio Armijos-Valarezo, Victor Manuel Arrieta-Arguedos, Donaldo Arrieta-Arrieta, Dogaberto Arrieta-Vargas, Rudecindo Angel Arroyo-Acuna, Guillermo Arroyo-Jimenez, Juan Luis Arroyo-Porras, Carlos Manuel Arroyo-S, Carlos Gabriel Arrue-Perez, Giovanny Artavia-Abarca, Henry Artavia-Abarca, Fernando Atencio-Flores, Carlos Enrique Atencio-Sanchez, Jose Angel Atencio-Vigil, Daniel Avelino-Reyes, Angel Oswaldo Ayala-Asanza, Miguel Ufredo Ayala-Asanza, Jorge Ayala-Villamar, Segundo Mariano Ayllon-Mejia, Wilmer Azofeifa-Calderon, John Baar-Aird, Manuel Bacini-Melvin, Mario Badilla-Gonzalez, Franklin Badilla-Prendas, William Badilla-Prendas, Manuel Baker-Moral, Nicolas Cesario Baldeon-Espinioza, Jonny Baldomero-Villagram, Carlos Vicente Ballas-Palacios, Teodoro Baltodano-Gomez, Froylan Baltodano-Grijalba, Ovidio Baltodano-Villareal, Andres Baltonado-Baltonado, Carlos Enrique Bamba-Perlosa, Prudencio Banchon-Andrade, Jose Alejandro Baque, Francisco Javier Baquerizo-Hernandez, Hipolito Barahona-Chavarria, Honorato Barba-Santos, Rolando Barillas, Omar Barquero-Chavez, Lorenzo Barquero-Ramirez, Jose Barrantes-Barrantes, Jose Alexis Barrantes-Cabalceta, Clodomiro Alban Barrantes-Duarte, Omar Barrantes-Esquivel, Jesus Barrantes-Rojas, Napoleon Barrantes-Sequeira, Pedro Gonzalo Barreto-Chizaca, Ricardo Barria-Pineda, German Barrientos-Jimenez, Francisco Bartolo Barzallo-Morocho, Jorge Barzola-Castro, Natividad Batista-Batista, Teodocio Baules-Rodriguez, Juan Francisco Bautista, Carlos Vicente Bayas-Palacios, Juan Becker-Becker, Gilberto Beitia-Castillo, Manuel Beker-Beker, William Beker-Mununimo, Gonzalo Beker-Santo, Cayo Belmuda-Belmuda, Fausto Rigoberto Belmuda-Morocho, Julio Benavides-Castillo, Juan Adolfo Benavides-Pilamunga, Jose Alejandro Benavidez-Escudero, Eddy Franklin Benitez-Anasco, Hirme Jose Benitez-Anasco, Klever Alberto Benitez-Ruiz, Ramo Domingo Bentura-Reyes, Luis Mario Bermeo-Bravo, Alfredo Rafael Bermeo-Jaramillo, Victor Juvencio Bermeo-Lavallen, Zoilo Carmelo Bermeo-Lavayen, Jose Oswaldo Bermeo-Morquecho, Fausto Rigoberto Bermuda-Morocho, Sixto Bolivar Bermudes-Chacha, Julio Gualberto Bermudes-Falcones, Marino Bermudez-Arias, Rodolfo Bermudez-Arias, Benjamin Bermudez-Montero, Ramon Felipe Bernabe-Cruz, Simon Mariano Bernal, Kleber Geovanny Blacio-Asanza, Frank Pablo Black-Murillo, Julio Segundo Bohorquez-Gomez, John Vidal Bohorquez-Penafiel, Nicolas Bojorques, Jose I. Bolano-Espinoza, Arsenio Bolanos-Herrera, Jesus Bolanos-Soto, Wilzon Bolivar-Suarez, Francisco Bolivia-Gallegos, Miguel Angel Boni-Quituisaca, Hernando Bonilla-Atencio, Jorge Bonilla-Cruz, Martin Bonilla-Jimenez, Ramon Evelio Bonilla-Leon, Julio Angel Bravo, Tomas Humberto Bravo-Bravo, Jorge Alberto Bravo-Hernandez, Carlos Diogenes Bravo-Macias, Flavio Isas Bravo-Palma, Mario Vicente Bravo-Quevedo, Kele Abraham Bravo-Ruilova, Jose Brenes-Gamboa, Miguel Angel Brenes-Gonzalez, William Brenes-Loaiza, Juan Rafael Brenes-Rojas, Victor Manuel Brenes-Rojas, Eugenio Briones-Gonzales, Xavier Rolando Briones-Nieves, Pablo Fernando Briones-Zapata, Mario Gilberto Brito-Dumas, Jose Rofilo Brito-Jumbo, Francisco Javier Bueno-Bueno, Juan Pedro Bueno-Bueno, Angel Benigno Bueno-Cabanilla, Fidel Alfonso Bueno-Sisamila, Juan De La Cruz Bueno-Sumba, Henry Maximiliano Bustamante-Porras, Manuel Milton Bustamente-Amaya, Ramon Wagner Buste-Zambrano, Edwin Alexis Bustos-Ramirez, Eduardo Bustos-Rivera, Manuel Enrique Caballero, Omar Ariel Caballero-Arauz, Humberto Caballero-Flores, Bolivar Caballero-Herrera, Jose Albinio Caballero-Samundio, Anibal Caballero-Tugri, Jesus Caballero-Valdes, Lisimaco Leonardo Cabanilla-Carrajal, Perfecto Cabello-Izquierdo, Luis Cabello-Reyes, Antonio Cabello-Tomala, Juan Bolivar Cabezas-Duran, Hugo Heradio Cabezas-Murillo, Julian Cabrera, Juan Delio Cabrera-Armijos, Angel F. Cabrera-Corte, Daniel Cabrera-Mendez, Raimundo Caceres-Miranda, Calixto Gregorio Cagua-Ayovi, Cesar Telmo Cagua-Carvajal, Lucilo Caiche-Rosales, Jorge Caiza-M., Antonio Cajamarca, Ricardo Amando Cajape-Holguin, Manuel Salvador Cajina-Aranda, Segundo Eloy Calderon-Ambuludi, Luis Antonio Calderon-Chica, Ricardo Calderon-Masis, Jorge Calderon-Montero, Henry Calderon-Naranjo, Carlos Calderon-Solano, Amable Calero, Fernando Calle-Bolivar, Enriquez Erazmo Calle-Fernandez, Hector Calvo-Castillo, Esteban Calvo-Loaiza, Vitelio Enrique Camacho-Ramires, Manuel Alberto Cambizaca-Pesantez, Juan Carlos Cambronero-Cespedes, Mariano Campos, Jose Joaquin Campos-Araya, Leonardo Campos-Campos, Jaime Eduardo Campos-Del Peso, Tacito Campos-Garcia, Fortunado Jacinto Campos-Mateo, Constantino Campos-Monge, German Campos-Monge, Alvaro Campos-Rodriguez, Eladio Campos-Sanchez, Segundo Anton Campoverde-Encarnacion, Ricardo Rodolfo Campoverde-Jara, Eulogio Ramiro Campuzano-Andrade, Alfredo Cando-Alfonso, Evaristo Cando-Lindao, Luis Vicente Cando-Lindao, Profirio Cando-Lindao, Jose Macario Cantillano-Jiron, Florentino Cantillano-Ugalde, Jose Luis Cantillo-Quiros, Froilan Caraguay-Arevalo, Ciseron Wencelao Carbajal-Gomez, Cesar Antono Carchi-Barrezueta, Cesar Rodrigo Carchi-Carchi, Jose Julian Carchi-Chuqui, Manuel Jesus Carchipulla-Inga, Pedro Pablo Carchipulla-Suque, Angel Wilfrido Cardenas-Centero, Antonio Rufino Cardenas-Chapiro, Angel Polibio Cardenas-Deleg, Daniel Francisco Cardenas-Deleg, Manuel De Jesus Cardenas-Deleg, Plutarco Cardenas-Lopez, Neemias Cardenas-Sandoval, Sigche Cardenas-Segundo, Manuel Jacinto Carion-Maldonado, Pablo Carmona-Mendez, Victor Hugo Carpio-Jaya, Manuel Nicolas Carpio-Pineda, Victor Manuel Carranza-Damazo, Elias Carranza-Sagalo, Alvaro Carranza-Sanchez, Geovanny Carranza-Sanchez, Mejia Bonifacio Carrera, Mario Carrera-Gonzalez, Santiago Carrera-Gonzalez, Guillermo Prospero Carriel-Montece, Jose Carrillo-Concepcion, Aurelio Carrillo-Hidalgo, Santos Carrillo-Martinez, Rafael Carrillo-Saraguro, Jose Rogelio Carrion, Yuri Jacinto Carrion-Montero, Luis Manuel Carrion-Vargas, Pedro Carrizo-Miranda, Cecilio Carvajal-Hidalgo, Ezequiel Carvajal-Picado, Cristobal Ediltudes Carvajal-Sigueza, Angel Casanova-Moreno, Adrian Cascante-Vargas, Juan Evangelista Casquete-Fuentes, Francisco Castaneda-Aguilar, Rodolfo Segundo Castaneda-Andreade, Omar Castillan-Marin, Juan Castillo-B., Hugo Castillo-Baquerizo, Cornelio Castillo-Castillo, Juan Castillo-Castillo, Ramon Castillo-Castillo, Samuel Castillo-Castillo, William Castillo-Castillo, Jose Francisco Castillo-Chinchilla, Bolivar Castillo-Concepcion, Amadeo Reinaldo Castillo-Coronel, Hortencio Meliton Cas
June 13, 2012 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-00696-RGA through 1:12-cv-00702-RGA(rjb)
June 1, 2012 No Summons Issued (dzs, )
June 1, 2012 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction (dzs, )
June 1, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against AMVAC Chemical Corporation, Chiquita Brands International Inc., Chiquita Brands LLC, Chiquita Fresh North America LLC, Del Monte Fresh Produce N.A. Inc., Dole Food Company Inc., Dole Fresh Fruit Co., Dow Chemical Company, Occidental Chemical Corporation, Shell Oil Company, Standard Fruit Company, Standard Fruit and Steamship Company - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0311-1083841.) - filed by Gonzalo Rodrigo Abad-Castillo et al. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(dzs, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abad-Castillo v. Dole Food Company Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Rosales-Rosales
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ivan Rafael Rubi-Chacon
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benigno De Jesus Ruiz-Badilla
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Saenz-Duarte
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rolando Sagot-Arias
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Alberto Sagot-Campos
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Salas-Arce
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Gerardo Salas-Medina
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rafael Angel Salas-Medina
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marvin Javier Salas-Monge
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Luis Salas-Mora
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ismael Salas-Nunez
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eduardo Salas-Vindas
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Salazar-Arias
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Salazar-Chacon
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Julio Salazar-Eduarte
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marvin Salazar-Murillo
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gorzon Salazar-Rodriguez
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberto Salazar-Salazar
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Maria Salazar-Vargas
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rafael Salgado-Avarado
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicolas Salguero-Franco
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Jose Salmeron-Castillo
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Salon-Angulo
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Martin Sanabria-Cerdas
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felix Sanarrusia-Solis
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcelino Sanchez-
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicolas Antonio Sanchez-B.
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Sanchez-Barrantes
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pedro Sanchez-Elizondo
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Inocencio Sanchez-Garcia
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pedro Antonio Sanchez-Gomez
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virgilio Sanchez-Herrera
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Angel Sanchez-Jimenez
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Javier Sanchez-Loaiza
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Sanchez-Madrigal
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rafael Angel Sanchez-Marin
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rafael Sanchez-Porra
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marco Sanchez-Porras
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Francisco Sanchez-Quiros
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alvaro Sanchez-Salazar
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Obed Alberto Sanchez-Serrano
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Sanchez-Zuniga
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jorge Sancho-Jimenez
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuel Antonio Sandi-Johnson
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerardino Sandi-Vargas
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rafael Angel Sandoval-Chinchilla
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Santana-Vargas
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Santos-Santos
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Napoleon Sarmiento-Sarmiento
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hernan Scarltte-Wagstalp
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marvin Segura-Castro
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Ricardo Segura-Ovares
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Santos Segura-Vargas
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edgar Sequeira-Flores
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Angel Sequeira-Villegas
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Alberto Serrano-Georgiel
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salustino Jose Serrano-Perez
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hernan Sevilla-Olivas
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ovidio Sibaja-Perez
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orlando Sojo-Cerdas
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Sojo-Cordero
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Gerardo Solano-Jimenez
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Jose Solano-Masis
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jorge Luis Solano-Menestel
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pedro Solano-Picado
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Julio Solano-Picado
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jorge Alberto Solano-Quiros
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gilberto Solis-Peraza
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emilio Abraham Solis-Rivera
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cayetano Soto-Cordero
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexis Soto-Fernandez
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco Soto-Mena
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Efrain Soto-Soto
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Horacio Stonestreet-Arcia
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jorge Suarez-Morales
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Luis Taylor-Taylor
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guillermo Enrique Taylor-Villareal
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oscar Tenorio-Bejarano
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felix Thomson-Thomson
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fabio Torres-A.
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfredo Antonio Torres-Corrales
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vernon Torres-Garcia
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benigno Torres-Hernandez
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Torres-Leon
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuel Torres-Mora
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nemecio Torres-Torres
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jorge Trejos-Trejos
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Fernando Ugalde-Rodriguez
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Luis Umana-Mejias
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rafael Angel Urena-Rojas
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus Nicolas Urena-Vargas
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Esquivel Urias-Chavarria
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rafael Cecilio. Valderramos-Bermuda
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco Valencia-Valencia
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Valerio-Chacon
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Luis Valladares-Rivera
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gilberto Valverde-Arroyo
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco Valverde-Gomez
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwin Valverde-Valverde
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Fermindel Vanegas-Victor
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Modesto Leonel Vanegas-Victor
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olger Vargas-Alfaro
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Alberto Vargas-Arguedas
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricardo Vargas-Arguedas
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Eliecer Vargas-Dias
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oriel Vargas-Duran
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Manuel Vargas-Fernandez
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Efrain Vargas-Mejia
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Vargas-Serrano
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Arturo Vargas-Urena
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Guillermo Vasquez-Brenes
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guadalupe Vega-Chaverri
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norman Vega-Chaverri
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerardo Vega-Loaiza
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcos Vega-Zamora
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramon Francisco Vega-Zamora
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Omar Velasquez-Solano
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: German Velasquez-Solano
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rafael Angel Velasquez-Zamora
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jorge Luis Venegas-Calvo
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pedro Francisco Venegas-Herrera
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Gerardo Victor-Victor
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacinto Villafuerte-Obando
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Maximiliano Villafuerte-Ramirez
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Gerardo Villalobos-Artavia
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Julio Villalobos-Badilla
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herminio Villalobos-Jimenez
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Ramon Villalobos-Mairena
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marco Tulic Villalobos-Murillo
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ulises Villalobos-Quesada
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oscar Gerardo Villalobos-Ramirez
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: German Villalobos-Salazar
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raul Villareal-Pena
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pedro Villarreal-Barrantes
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cornelio Villarreal-Ortega
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Santos Enrique Villarreal-Villarreal
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andres Villegas-Cruz
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danillo Vindas-Guerrero
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco Vindas-Rubi
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Javier Viquez-Arias
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Angel Viquez-Brenes
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramon Zuniga-Chacon
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonel Zuniga-Rojas
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: German Zuniga-Roman
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Rafael Zuniga-Salas
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Zuniga-Solano
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco Zuniga-Soto
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tomas Zuniga-Villarreal
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dogaberto Zuniga-Zuniga
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Angel Zuniga-Zuniga
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricardo Abrego-A.
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alejandro Abrego-Abrego
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andres Abrego-Abrego
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fernando Abrego-Abrego
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ignacio Abrego-Abrego
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberto Abrego-Abrego
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federico Abrego-Beker
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Abrego-Beker
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Abrego-Castillo
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Abrego-Chi
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arturo Abrego-Chico
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valentin Abrego-Chico
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gavino Abrego-Chiro
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chale Abrego-Choba
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Celestino Abrego-Chopa
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bentura Abrego-Chuto
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emiliano Abrego-Garay
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Abrego-Ichi
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marchena Abrego-Ichi
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Abrego-Miranda
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaime Abrego-Nico
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pedro Abrego-Ocho
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cornelio Abrego-Sandoya
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Florentino Abrego-Santos
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benancio Abrego-Tico
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicolas Abrigo-Nico
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuel Acosta-Samudio
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alcibiades Alvarado-Pimentel
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Alvarez-Guerrero
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felix Dimas Arauz-Atencio
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Onesimo Arauz-Cortez
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Feliciano Arauz-Guerra
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Porfirio Arauz-Quintero
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Celso Arauz-Sanchez
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fulvio Arauz-Viquez
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorenzo Arcia-Morales
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Palacio Arias-Chupa
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Octavio Arjona-Rodriguez
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fernando Atencio-Flores
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Enrique Atencio-Sanchez
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Angel Atencio-Vigil
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuel Baker-Moral
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricardo Barria-Pineda
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natividad Batista-Batista
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teodocio Baules-Rodriguez
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Becker-Becker
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gilberto Beitia-Castillo
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuel Beker-Beker
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Beker-Mununimo
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gonzalo Beker-Santo
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Simon Mariano Bernal
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hernando Bonilla-Atencio
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Bonilla-Jimenez
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuel Enrique Caballero
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Omar Ariel Caballero-Arauz
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Humberto Caballero-Flores
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bolivar Caballero-Herrera
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Albinio Caballero-Samundio
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anibal Caballero-Tugri
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus Caballero-Valdes
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raimundo Caceres-Miranda
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mejia Bonifacio Carrera
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mario Carrera-Gonzalez
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Santiago Carrera-Gonzalez
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pedro Carrizo-Miranda
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cornelio Castillo-Castillo
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Castillo-Castillo
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Castillo-Castillo
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bolivar Castillo-Concepcion
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramon Castillo-Garay
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Castillo-Ichi
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberto Castillo-Miranda
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco Castillo-Morales
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yimi Castillo-Nitgore
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Demetrio Cedeno
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Baldomero Cedeno-Caceres
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roman Cedeno-Cruz
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rogelio Cedeno-Gomez
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Didimo Cedeno-Ortiz
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paulino Jose Cedeno-Quintero
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexis Chavez-Morales
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cam Chichi-Taylor
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Harry Chin-M.
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justo Chuito-Molina
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernardino Cianca-Salinas
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Santos Clemente-Juan
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Enrique Corella-Arcia
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edgar Corella-Santamaria
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eduardo Cubilla-Carrillo
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriel De Garcia-Batista
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abundio De Garcia-Bejerano
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sadi De Gracia-De Leon
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hector De Leon-Justavino
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jorge Degracia-Bejerano
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuel Eugenio Duarte-Sanchez
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Escalante-Alvarez
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eustasio Espinosa
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Faustino Espinosa
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel Enrique Espinosa-Chacon
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pedro Flores-Ortega
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rufino Franco-Cortes
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hipolito Fuentes
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilfredo Galdamez-Arias
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vicente Garay-Garay
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pablo Macario Garay-Santiago
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pablo Gomez
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel Gomez-Gonzalez
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eduardo Gomez-Ortega
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eustacio Gomez-Sanchez
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olmedo Gonzales-Mojica
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gilberto Elias Gonzalez
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus Gonzalez-Jordan
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel Gonzalez-Lezcano
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Domingo Gonzalez-Miranda
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Modesto Gonzalez-Pineda
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Espolito Gonzalez-Sanchez
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mario Gonzalez-Sanchez
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Agustin Gonzalez-Torres
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco Guerra E.
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Santiago Guerra-Becker
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alejandro Guerra-Beker
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Celso Guerra-Gonzalez
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Guerra-Guerra
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcelino Guerra-Morales
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vicente Guerra-Nichi
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rolando Guerra-Santos
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seferino Gutierrez-Martinez
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pedro Felipe Hawking-Jimenez
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus Hernandez-Delgado
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicomedes Hernandez-Gonzalez
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Alberto Hernandez-Moreno
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elias Hernandez-Vasquez
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ceferino Herrera
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Esteban Herrera-De Gracia
Represented By: