Apple Inc. v. HTC Corporation et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Apple Inc.
Defendant: HTC Corporation, HTC America Inc., One & Company Design, Inc. and HTC America Innovation Inc.
Counter_claimant: One & Company Design, Inc., HTC America Innovation Inc., HTC Corporation and HTC America Inc.
Counter_defendant: Apple Inc.
Case Number: 1:2012cv01004
Filed: August 3, 2012
Court: Delaware District Court
Office: Wilmington Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Gregory M. Sleet
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 16, 2012 CASE CLOSED (mmm)
November 12, 2012 144 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Entire Action Without Prejudice by Apple Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC America Innovation Inc., HTC Corporation, One & Company Design, Inc.. (Matterer, Mary)
November 9, 2012 143 Joint STATEMENT Pursuant to Local Rule 81.2 by Apple Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC America Innovation Inc., HTC Corporation, One & Company Design, Inc.. (Keller, Karen)
October 31, 2012 142 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Apple Inc.'s Identification of Accused Products by Apple Inc..(Herrmann, Richard)
October 31, 2012 141 NOTICE OF SERVICE of HTC's Disclosure of Apple Accused Products by HTC America Inc., HTC America Innovation Inc., HTC Corporation, One & Company Design, Inc..(Fry, David)
October 12, 2012 140 DECLARATION re 139 Reply Brief (Declaration of Simona Agnolucci) by HTC America Inc., HTC America Innovation Inc., HTC Corporation, One & Company Design, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J)(Fry, David)
October 12, 2012 139 REPLY BRIEF re 129 MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by HTC America Inc., HTC America Innovation Inc., HTC Corporation, One & Company Design, Inc.. (Fry, David)
October 1, 2012 138 DECLARATION re 137 Answering Brief in Opposition executed by Michael T. Pieja by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1 - 17, # 2 Exhibit 18, # 3 Exhibits 19 - 23, # 4 Exhibits 24 - 25, # 5 Exhibits 26 - 29)(Herrmann, Richard)
October 1, 2012 137 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 129 MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by Apple Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 10/12/2012. (Herrmann, Richard)
September 17, 2012 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 136 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Plaintiff to respond to HTC Defendants' Motion to Stay Proceedings to October 1, 2012 filed by One & Company Design, Inc., Apple Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, HTC America Innovation Inc., Reset Briefing Schedule: re 129 MOTION to Stay Proceedings. (Answering Brief due 10/1/2012.). Ordered by Chief Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 9/17/2012. (asw)
September 17, 2012 136 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Plaintiff to respond to HTC Defendants' Motion to Stay Proceedings to October 1, 2012 - filed by Apple Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC America Innovation Inc., HTC Corporation, One & Company Design, Inc.. (Herrmann, Richard)
September 13, 2012 135 ANSWER to 132 Answer to Counterclaim, (HTC's Answer To Apple Inc.'s Counterclaims To HTC Defendants' Counterclaims) by HTC America Inc., HTC America Innovation Inc., HTC Corporation, One & Company Design, Inc..(Fry, David)
September 11, 2012 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 125 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for a response to Apple's Counterclaims to 7 days from the date when Apple's Counterclaims appear on the docket in the District of Delaware filed by One & Company Design, Inc., Apple Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, HTC America Innovation Inc. Ordered by Chief Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 9/7/2012. (asw)
September 10, 2012 134 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) HTC Defendants' Responses To Apple Inc.'s Second Set of Requests For Production of Documents (Nos. 39-71) (2) HTC Defendants' Responses To Apple Inc.'s Second Set Of Interrogatories (Nos. 6-8) by HTC America Inc., HTC America Innovation Inc., HTC Corporation, One & Company Design, Inc..(Fry, David)
September 10, 2012 133 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Infringement Contentions by Apple Inc..(Herrmann, Richard)
September 7, 2012 132 ANSWER to 115 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim,, , COUNTERCLAIM against HTC America Inc., HTC America Innovation Inc., HTC Corporation, One & Company Design, Inc. by Apple Inc..(Herrmann, Richard)
August 31, 2012 131 DECLARATION re 129 MOTION to Stay Proceedings (Declaration of Rebekah L. Punak) by HTC America Inc., HTC America Innovation Inc., HTC Corporation, One & Company Design, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I (part 1 of 4), # 10 Exhibit I (part 2 of 4), # 11 Exhibit I (part 3 of 4), # 12 Exhibit I (part 4 of 4), # 13 Exhibit J, # 14 Exhibit K)(Fry, David)
August 31, 2012 130 OPENING BRIEF in Support re 129 MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by HTC America Inc., HTC America Innovation Inc., HTC Corporation, One & Company Design, Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 9/17/2012. (Fry, David)
August 31, 2012 129 MOTION to Stay Proceedings - filed by HTC America Inc., HTC America Innovation Inc., HTC Corporation, One & Company Design, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certification Pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Fry, David)
August 30, 2012 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 128 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kenneth H. Bridges, Attorney Lawrence Lien, Attorney Christopher Lubeck, Attorney Michael T. Pieja, and Attorney Aaron C. Taggart filed by Apple Inc. Ordered by Chief Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 8/30/2012. (asw)
August 29, 2012 128 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kenneth H. Bridges, Attorney Lawrence Lien, Attorney Christopher Lubeck, Attorney Michael T. Pieja, and Attorney Aaron C. Taggart - filed by Apple Inc.. (Herrmann, Richard)
August 27, 2012 127 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (i) Apple's Second Set of Requests for Production to HTC Defendants (Nos. 39-71); and (ii) Apple's Second Set of Interrogatories to HTC Defendants (Nos. 6-8) by Apple Inc..(Herrmann, Richard)
August 24, 2012 126 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard K. Herrmann on behalf of Apple Inc. (Herrmann, Richard)
August 24, 2012 125 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for a response to Apple's Counterclaims to 7 days from the date when Apple's Counterclaims appear on the docket in the District of Delaware - filed by Apple Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC America Innovation Inc., HTC Corporation, One & Company Design, Inc.. (Fry, David)
August 23, 2012 124 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) HTC Defendants' Responses to Apple Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-5) by HTC America Inc., HTC America Innovation Inc., HTC Corporation, One & Company Design, Inc..(Fry, David)
August 23, 2012 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Brian L. Ferrall,Rebekah L. Punak,Simona A. Agnolucci,Leo L. Lam for HTC Corporation added for electronic noticing. (rbe)
August 16, 2012 123 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) HTC Defendants' Responses to Apple Inc.'s First Set of Requests for Production of Documents (Nos. 1-38) by HTC America Inc., HTC America Innovation Inc., HTC Corporation, One & Company Design, Inc..(Fry, David)
August 16, 2012 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 122 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Leo L. Lam, Brian L. Ferrall, Rebekah L. Punak, and Simona Agnolucci filed by One & Company Design, Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, HTC America Innovation Inc. Ordered by Chief Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 8/16/12. (mmm)
August 15, 2012 122 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Leo L. Lam, Brian L. Ferrall, Rebekah L. Punak, and Simona Agnolucci - filed by HTC America Inc., HTC America Innovation Inc., HTC Corporation, One & Company Design, Inc.. (Shaw, John)
August 15, 2012 121 NOTICE of Appearance by John W. Shaw on behalf of All Defendants (Shaw, John)
August 8, 2012 Case Assigned to Judge Gregory M. Sleet. Please include the initials of the Judge (GMS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
August 3, 2012 120 Local Counsel Letters sent. Notice of Compliance deadline set for 9/7/2012. (dzb, )
August 3, 2012 119 Record of case transferred in from District of Florida Southern; Case Number in Other District: 1:12-cv-20271. Copy of Docket Sheet and original file
July 31, 2012 116 Featured Case ORDER granting HTC's 83 Motion to Sever and 97 Motion to Change Venue. See ORDER for details. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. on 7/31/2012. (jky) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/3/2012.]
July 17, 2012 115 FIRST AMENDED ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Apple Inc. by HTC America Innovation Inc., HTC Corporation, HTC America, Inc., One & Company Design, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-20271-RNS, 1:10-cv-23580-RNS(Carey, John) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/3/2012.]
July 12, 2012 114 Featured Case ORDER granting 113 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. on 7/12/2012. (jky) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/3/2012.]
July 11, 2012 113 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Apple Inc., HTC America Innovation Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., One & Company Design, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Pace, Christopher) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/3/2012.]
July 9, 2012 112 REPLY to Response to Motion re (97 in 1:12-cv-20271-RNS) MOTION to Change Venue filed by HTC America Innovation Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, One & Company Design, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Simona A. Agnolucci in Support)Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-20271-RNS, 1:10-cv-23580-RNS(Carey, John) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/3/2012.]
July 9, 2012 111 Featured Case ORDER denying 108 Apple's Motion to Strike Portion of Motorola's Response to HTC's Motion to Transfer Venue. See the attached ORDER for details. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. on 7/9/2012. (jky) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/3/2012.]
July 5, 2012 108 MOTION to Strike 103 Response/Reply (Other) by Apple Inc.. Responses due by 7/23/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Pace, Christopher) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/3/2012.]
June 28, 2012 105 RESPONSE to Motion re 97 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Motorola Mobility, Inc.. Replies due by 7/9/2012. (ls)(See Image at DE # 103 ) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/3/2012.]
June 28, 2012 104 RESPONSE in Opposition re 97 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Lawrence Lien in Support, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 Exhibit 20, # 22 Exhibit 21, # 23 Exhibit 22, # 24 Exhibit 23, # 25 Exhibit 24, # 26 Exhibit 25, # 27 Exhibit 26, # 28 Exhibit 27, # 29 Exhibit 28)(Pace, Christopher) Modified on 6/29/2012 (ls). [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/3/2012.]
June 28, 2012 103 RESPONSE/REPLY to 97 MOTION to Change Venue by Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Kruse, Regan) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/3/2012.]
June 26, 2012 102 ANSWER TO DEFENDANT AND COUNTERCLAIM PAINTIFF APPLE'S INC'S COUNTERCLAIMS TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT Re: 95 in 1:12-cv-20271-RNS Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim, by HTC America Innovation Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, One & Company Design, Inc.. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-20271-RNS, 1:10-cv-23580-RNS(Carey, John) Modified text on 6/26/2012 (bb). [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/3/2012.]
June 11, 2012 99 NOTICE by HTC America Innovation Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, One & Company Design, Inc. re (98 in 1:12-cv-20271-RNS) Affidavit in Support of Motion,, of Filing Corrected Exhibit (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-20271-RNS, 1:10-cv-23580-RNS(Carey, John) Modified on 6/12/2012 (ls). [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/3/2012.]
June 9, 2012 98 AFFIDAVIT in Support re 97 MOTION to Change Venue Declaration of Rebekah L. Punak filed by HTC America Innovation Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S)(Carey, John) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/3/2012.]
June 9, 2012 97 MOTION to Change Venue by HTC America Innovation Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation. Responses due by 6/28/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Stephanie Bariault, # 3 Declaration of Jamie L. Benson)(Carey, John) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/3/2012.]
June 8, 2012 96 REPLY to Response to Motion re (83 in 1:12-cv-20271-RNS) MOTION to Sever filed by HTC America Innovation Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Raymond Pao, # 2 Declaration of Rebekah L. Punak)Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-20271-RNS, 1:10-cv-23580-RNS(Carey, John) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/3/2012.]
May 29, 2012 93 RESPONSE in Opposition re 83 MOTION to Sever filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael T. Pieja in Support of Defendant and Counterclaim Plaintiff Apple Inc.'s Opposition to Motion to Sever, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 Exhibit 20, # 22 Exhibit 21, # 23 Exhibit 22, # 24 Exhibit 23, # 25 Exhibit 24, # 26 Exhibit 25, # 27 Exhibit 26, # 28 Exhibit 27, # 29 Exhibit 28, # 30 Exhibit 29, # 31 Exhibit 30, # 32 Exhibit 31, # 33 Exhibit 32, # 34 Exhibit 33, # 35 Exhibit 34, # 36 Exhibit 35, # 37 Exhibit 36, # 38 Exhibit 37, # 39 Exhibit 38, # 40 Exhibit 39, # 41 Exhibit 40, # 42 Exhibit 41)(Pace, Christopher) Modified on 5/30/2012 (ls). [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/3/2012.]
May 29, 2012 91 MOTION to Adopt/Join 83 MOTION to Sever by Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Kruse, Regan) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/3/2012.]
May 11, 2012 83 MOTION to Sever by HTC America Innovation Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation. Responses due by 5/29/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Mohammed Versi, # 2 Declaration of Simona A. Agnolucci)(Carey, John) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/3/2012.]
May 11, 2012 82 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by HTC America Innovation Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, One & Company Design, Inc..(Carey, John) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/3/2012.]
March 12, 2012 27 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Motorola Mobility, Inc. by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O)(Pace, Christopher) Modified on 3/13/2012 (ls). [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/3/2012.]
January 24, 2012 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against All Defendants. Filing fee $ 350.00 receipt number 113C-4398912, filed by Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summon(s), # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6)(Mullins, Edward) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/3/2012.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Apple Inc. v. HTC Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Apple Inc.
Represented By: Richard K. Herrmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HTC Corporation
Represented By: Rebekah L. Punak
Represented By: Leo L. Lam
Represented By: David M. Fry
Represented By: Brian L. Ferrall
Represented By: Simona A. Agnolucci
Represented By: John W. Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HTC America Inc.
Represented By: David M. Fry
Represented By: John W. Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One & Company Design, Inc.
Represented By: David M. Fry
Represented By: John W. Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HTC America Innovation Inc.
Represented By: David M. Fry
Represented By: John W. Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: One & Company Design, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: HTC America Innovation Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: HTC Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: HTC America Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?