Motorola Mobility LLC et al v. Apple Inc. Featured Case
Plaintiff: Motorola Mobility LLC, Motorola Mobility Ireland and Motorola Mobility International Limited
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Case Number: 1:2012cv01053
Filed: August 17, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Gregory M. Sleet
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 31, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2012 CASE CLOSED (mmm)
October 1, 2012 Filing 9 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Apple Inc., Motorola Mobility International Limited, Motorola Mobility Ireland, Motorola Mobility LLC. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
October 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting 7 Motion to Stay. Signed by Chief Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 10/1/2012. (asw)
September 28, 2012 Filing 7 MOTION to Stay (Apple's Unopposed Motion Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §1659) - filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Balick, Steven)
September 20, 2012 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to the Complaint to October 22, 2012 filed by Apple Inc., Motorola Mobility International Limited, Motorola Mobility Ireland, Motorola Mobility LLC, Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Apple Inc. answer due 08/22/2012. Ordered by Chief Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 9/20/2012. (asw)
September 19, 2012 Filing 6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to the Complaint to October 22, 2012 - filed by Apple Inc., Motorola Mobility International Limited, Motorola Mobility Ireland, Motorola Mobility LLC. (Balick, Steven)
August 30, 2012 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Motorola Mobility LLC, Motorola Mobility Ireland, Motorola Mobility International Limited. Apple Inc. served on 8/30/2012, answer due 9/20/2012. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
August 29, 2012 Case Assigned to Judge Gregory M. Sleet. Please include the initials of the Judge (GMS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
August 21, 2012 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Motorola Mobility International Limited, Motorola Mobility Ireland, Motorola Mobility LLC identifying Other Affiliate Google Inc. for Motorola Mobility International Limited, Motorola Mobility Ireland, Motorola Mobility LLC.. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
August 20, 2012 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Apple Inc. on 8/20/2012. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (rwc)
August 17, 2012 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 5,883,580; 5,922,047; 6,425,002 B1; 6,493,673 B1; 6,983,370 B2. (rwc)
August 17, 2012 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (rwc)
August 17, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT - filed with Jury Demand against Apple Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 350.00, receipt number 0311-1125076.) - filed by Motorola Mobility LLC, Motorola Mobility Ireland, Motorola Mobility International Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1 through 7, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(rwc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Motorola Mobility LLC et al v. Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Motorola Mobility LLC
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: Maryellen Noreika
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Motorola Mobility Ireland
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: Maryellen Noreika
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Motorola Mobility International Limited
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: Maryellen Noreika
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?