Davis et al v. Ace Hardware Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Harry A. Davis and Madonna S. Davis
Defendant: BorgWarner Morse Tec Inc., Georgia Pacific LLC, Honeywell International Inc., Industrial Holdings Corporation, Soco-West Inc., Trane US Inc., United Technologies Corporation, Whitney Automotive Group Inc., Ace Hardware Corporation, Advance Auto Parts Inc., AGCO Corporation, American Honda Motor Company Inc., Autozone Inc., Boeing Co., Borg-Warner Corporation, Carlisle Companies Incorporated, Carrier Corporation, CBS Corporation, CNH America LLC, Columbia Boiler Company, Crane Co., Cummins Inc., Dana Companies LLC, Domco Products LLP, Eaton Corporation, Ford Motor Company, General Dynamics Corporation, General Electric Co., Georgia-Pacific Corporation, Great Dane Limited Partnership, H.B. Fuller Company, AlliedSignal Inc., Bendix Corporation, Carborundum Company, John Deere Company, John K. Bice Inc., Kaiser Gypsum Company Inc., Kohler Co., Lennox Industries Inc., Lockheed Martin Corporation, Massey Ferguson Co., Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, National Automotive Parts Association, New Holland North America Inc., Paccar Inc., Peerless Industries doing business as Peerless Heater Company, Pneumo Abex Corporation, Rapid American Corporation, Rheem Manufacturing Company, Robert Bosch LLC, Brenntag West Inc., Soco-Lynch Corporation, Superior Boiler Works Inc., American Standard Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, Pratt & Whitney, J.C.C. Whitney & Co., York International Corporation, General Parts Inc., Genuine Parts Company and Domco Products Texas Inc.
Cross Defendant: Peerless Industries
Case Number: 1:2012cv01185
Filed: September 21, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: New Castle
Presiding Judge: Christopher J Burke
Referring Judge: Sue L Robinson
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal-Asbestos Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 371 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS #370 granting #369 Motion to Dismiss (CASE CLOSED). Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 9/2/2014. (nmfn)
August 11, 2014 Filing 370 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending granting of D.I. #369 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Plaintiffs' Failure to File an Amended Complaint filed by United Technologies Corporation. Please note that when filing Objections pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b)(2), briefing consists solely of the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages) and the Response to the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages). No further briefing shall be permitted with respect to objections without leave of the Court. Objections to R&R due by 8/28/2014. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 8/11/2014. (dlk)
July 21, 2014 Filing 369 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Plaintiffs' Failure to File an Amended Complaint - filed by United Technologies Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A)Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(Bradley, Paul) (Attachment 2 replaced on 7/21/2014) (fms).
July 21, 2014 CORRECTING ENTRY: Exhibit A attached to D.I. Nos. 363 and 369 has been removed and replaced with a redacted version. (fms)
July 14, 2014 Filing 368 Letter to The Honorable Christopher J. Burke, Magistrate Judge from Diane Coffey regarding Today's Deadline to File Amended Complaint to Comply With F.A.S.A.. (Coffey, Diane)
July 9, 2014 Filing 367 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Robert Pierce on behalf of Kohler Co. (Pierce, Matthew)
July 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 366 MEMORANDUM ORDER GRANTING D.I. #364 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply to Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Their Motion For An Extension For Time to File an Amended Complaint filed by United Technologies Corporation, and GRANTING D.I. #358 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File an Amended Complaint #356 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations, Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Report and Recommendations, Order on Motion to Dismiss/Failure to State Claim,,,,,,,, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Harry A. Davis. Plaintiffs are granted an extension until 7/14/14 to file an amended complaint. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 07/02/2014. (mlc)
July 1, 2014 Filing 365 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie S. Levitsky on behalf of New Holland North America Inc. (Levitsky, Stephanie)
June 30, 2014 Filing 364 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply to Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Their Motion For An Extension For Time to File an Amended Complaint - filed by United Technologies Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Defendants' Sur-Reply)Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(Bradley, Paul)
June 26, 2014 Filing 363 REPLY to Response to Motion re #358 First MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend #356 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations, Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Report and Recommendations, Order on Motion to Dismiss/Failure to State Claim,,,,,,,, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Harry A. Davis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Coffey, Diane) (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/21/2014) (fms).
June 26, 2014 Filing 362 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Pneumo Abex LLC's Individual Witness and Amended Exhibit Lists re #290 Notice of Service filed by Pneumo Abex Corporation.(Reese, C.)
June 25, 2014 Filing 361 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Robert Pierce on behalf of Georgia Pacific LLC (Pierce, Matthew)
June 16, 2014 Filing 360 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #358 First MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend #356 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations, Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Report and Recommendations, Order on Motion to Dismiss/Failure to State Claim,,,,,,,, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by United Technologies Corporation.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 6/26/2014. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bradley, Paul)
June 12, 2014 Filing 359 Letter to the Honorable Christopher J. Burke from Donald R. Kinsley, Defense Liaison Counsel, and Diane M. Coffey, Plaintiffs' Counsel regarding response in compliance with Oral Order dated June 9, 2014. (Kinsley, Donald)
June 9, 2014 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER: The Court having reviewed Plaintiff's motion for an extension of time (D.I. 358), the parties are ORDERED to file, by no later than June 13, 2014, a joint letter with the Court. The joint letter shall contain the following: (1) a statement by Plaintiff as to what is the new date until which Plaintiff is seeking an extension to file an amended complaint; and (2) a statement indicating whether any Defendant objects to Plaintiff's motion. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 6/9/2014. (dlk)
June 5, 2014 Filing 358 First MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend #356 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations, Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Report and Recommendations, Order on Motion to Dismiss/Failure to State Claim,,,,,,,, #1 Notice of Removal, - filed by Harry A. Davis. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certification of Counsel)Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(Coffey, Diane)
May 8, 2014 Filing 357 NOTICE of WITHDRAWAL OF BRIAN D. TOME AS COUNSEL by CNH America LLC (Tome, Brian)
April 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 356 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS #351 granting #283 Motion to Dismiss ; finding as moot #64 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs' claims are dismissed without prejudice to file an amended complaint on or before June 6, 2014 addressing the deficiencies noted in the Report & Recommendation. NOTE: If plaintiffs fail to timely file an amended complaint, their claims may be deemed dismissed with prejudice and the case closed. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants' motion to stay #287 is granted. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 4/11/2014. (nmfn)
March 21, 2014 Filing 355 RESPONSE TO OBJECTIONS by United Technologies Corporation re #353 Objection to Report and Recommendations of the Honorable Christopher J. Burke. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Bradley, Paul)
March 18, 2014 Filing 354 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance of Jennifer D. Davis Oliva as Counsel for The Boeing Company by Boeing Co. (Barillo, Nathan)
March 10, 2014 Filing 353 OBJECTION to #351 Report and Recommendations by Harry A. Davis. (Coffey, Diane)
March 7, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED D.I. #261 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kyle Eiselstein filed by Autozone Inc., #245 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Edward M. Newsom, Esquire filed by Autozone Inc., #233 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Marcia Eason filed by Autozone Inc.. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 2/27/2014. (dlk)
February 24, 2014 Filing 352 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL re All Plaintiffs : Entry of appearance of attorney Diane M. Coffey. Attorney Kara Hager terminated. (Coffey, Diane)
February 21, 2014 Filing 351 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending DENYING AS MOOT D.I. #64 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Paccar Inc., recommending GRANTING D.I. #283 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Plaintiffs' Failure to Comply with Florida's Asbestos and Silica Compensation Fairness Act filed by Genuine Parts Company, National Automotive Parts Association, United Technologies Corporation, and GRANTING D.I. #287 MOTION to Stay All Discovery and Pretrial Deadlines filed by United Technologies Corporation. Please note that when filing Objections pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b)(2), briefing consists solely of the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages) and the Response to the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages). No further briefing shall be permitted with respect to objections without leave of the Court. Objections to R&R due by 3/10/2014. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 02/21/2014. (mlc)
February 7, 2014 Filing 350 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan David Barillo on behalf of Boeing Co. (Barillo, Nathan)
February 7, 2014 Filing 349 Letter to The Honorable Christopher J. Burke from Paul A. Bradley, Esq. regarding a recent decision from the Delaware Superior Court addressing the Florida Asbestos and Silica Compensation Fairness Act. (Attachments: #1 Delaware Superior Court Decision in Fluitt)(Bradley, Paul)
February 6, 2014 Filing 348 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Jeffrey S. Marlin, Esquire as co-counsel. Reason for request: He is No Longer with the Firm. (Ford, Eileen)
January 15, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #347 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Lennox Industries Inc. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 1/15/2014. (fms)
January 15, 2014 Filing 347 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Lennox Industries Inc.. (Fruehauf, Barbara) (Main Document 347 replaced on 3/6/2014) (fms).
January 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 346 ORDER granting #343 Motion to Dismiss General Dynamics Corporation. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 1/7/2014. (nmfn)
December 27, 2013 Filing 345 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Amended Witness and Exhibt List filed by United Technologies Corporation.(Bradley, Paul)
December 20, 2013 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER: In light of the stipulation between General Dynamics Corporation and plaintiffs dismissing plaintiffs' claims made against General Dynamics Corporation (D.I. 325), and General Dynamics Corporation's motion to dismiss all claims and cross claims against it (D.I. 343), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that if any other defendant opposes General Dynamics Corporation's motion, such opposition must be filed by no later than January 2, 2014. If no opposition is filed by that date, the District Court will enter an order dismissing General Dynamics Corporation from this case. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 12/20/2013. (dlk)
December 19, 2013 Filing 344 PROPOSED ORDER granting dismissal of all claims and cross-claims against General Dynamics Corporation re #343 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon a stipulation of dismissal was signed by the parties and filed with the Court (D.I. 325). by General Dynamics Corporation. (Beste, Robert)
December 18, 2013 Filing 343 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon a stipulation of dismissal was signed by the parties and filed with the Court (D.I. 325). - filed by General Dynamics Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Letter to Judge Burke)Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(Beste, Robert)
December 13, 2013 Filing 342 Official Transcript of hearing held on October 29, 2013 before Judge Burke. Court Reporter/Transcriber Taneha Carroll,Telephone number (3020 658-6697. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/3/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/13/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/13/2014. (vjg)
November 25, 2013 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER: In light of the stipulation (D.I. 320) staying all pretrial deadlines pending the Court's decision on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (D.I. 283), the status teleconference set for 12/2/2013 is hereby CANCELLED. The Court will reschedule the status teleconference as necessary. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 11/25/2013. (dlk)
November 7, 2013 Filing 341 NOTICE of Appearance by Bernadette M. Plaza on behalf of Domco Products Texas Inc. (Plaza, Bernadette)
November 6, 2013 Filing 340 NOTICE of Appearance by Willard F. Preston, III on behalf of Domco Products Texas Inc. (Preston, Willard)
November 4, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED D.I. #338 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME - Responses to Interrogatories, Requests for Production and Requests for Admissions served by Plaintiffs on Defendants on or about September 5, 2013 will be due thirty (30) days after a final order is entered by the Court on filed by United Technologies Corporation. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 10/25/2013. (dlk)
November 1, 2013 Filing 339 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie Elizabeth Smiertka on behalf of Georgia Pacific LLC (Smiertka, Stephanie)
October 29, 2013 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Christopher J. Burke - Motion Hearing held on 10/29/2013 re #283 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Plaintiffs' Failure to Comply with Florida's Asbestos and Silica Compensation Fairness Act filed by Genuine Parts Company, National Automotive Parts Association, United Technologies Corporation. Motion taken under advisement. (Court Reporter T. Carroll (Hawkins)) (dlk)
October 25, 2013 Filing 338 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME - Responses to Interrogatories, Requests for Production and Requests for Admissions served by Plaintiffs on Defendants on or about September 5, 2013 will be due thirty (30) days after a final order is entered by the Court on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss to - filed by United Technologies Corporation. (Bradley, Paul)
October 22, 2013 Filing 337 ANSWER to Complaint with TRIAL BY JURY OF TWELVE DEMANDED and, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Ford Motor Company.(Singewald, Christian)
October 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 336 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion D.I. #283 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Plaintiffs' Failure to Comply with Florida's Asbestos and Silica Compensation Fairness Act : A Motion Hearing is set for 10/29/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6C before Judge Christopher J. Burke. The Court has allocated one (1) hour per side for argument. See Order for further details. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 10/16/2013. (mlc)
October 15, 2013 Filing 335 REQUEST for Oral Argument by Genuine Parts Company, National Automotive Parts Association, United Technologies Corporation re #283 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Plaintiffs' Failure to Comply with Florida's Asbestos and Silica Compensation Fairness Act. (Bradley, Paul)
October 15, 2013 Filing 334 REPLY BRIEF re #283 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Plaintiffs' Failure to Comply with Florida's Asbestos and Silica Compensation Fairness Act filed by Genuine Parts Company, National Automotive Parts Association, United Technologies Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bradley, Paul)
October 15, 2013 Filing 333 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Domco Products Texas Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Tarkett Enterprises Inc. for Domco Products Texas Inc... (Preston, Willard)
October 10, 2013 Filing 332 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Eaton Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Eaton Corporation, plc (Ireland) for Eaton Corporation.. (Naylor, Joseph)
October 9, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED D.I. #331 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Defendants' Reply In Support of Their Motion to Dismiss Based on Plaintiffs' Failure to Comply with Florida's Asbestos and Silica Compensation Fairness Act to Tuesday, October 15, 2013 filed by United Technologies Corporation. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 10/9/2013. (dlk)
October 8, 2013 Filing 331 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Defendants' Reply In Support of Their Motion to Dismiss Based on Plaintiffs' Failure to Comply with Florida's Asbestos and Silica Compensation Fairness Act to Tuesday, October 15, 2013 - filed by United Technologies Corporation. (Bradley, Paul)
October 4, 2013 Filing 330 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Carlisle Industrial Brake & Friction, Inc.'s Responses to Requests for Admission, Responses to First Set of Interrogatories and Responses to Request for Production of Documents by Carlisle Companies Incorporated.(Daly, Daniel)
October 4, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED D.I. #322 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Answers to Plaintiff's Interrogatories, Request for Admissions and Responses to Request for Production to November 4, 2013 filed by Lockheed Martin Corporation Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 10/1/2013. (dlk)
October 3, 2013 Filing 329 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Notice of Service of Defendant Rheem Manufacturing Company's Responses to Plaintiffs' Interrogatories, Responses to Plaintifff's Request for Admission, and Responses to Plaintiffs' Request for Production re #281 Notice of Service,,,, by Rheem Manufacturing Company. Related document: #281 Notice of Service,,,, filed by Madonna S. Davis, Harry A. Davis.(Parshall, Jonathan)
October 3, 2013 Filing 328 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Responses to Plaintiffs' Request for Production and Requests for Admissions by Kaiser Gypsum Company Inc..(Della Porta, Armand)
October 3, 2013 Filing 327 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories by Kaiser Gypsum Company Inc..(Della Porta, Armand)
October 2, 2013 Filing 326 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Kevin McCoy, Esq. as co-counsel. Reason for request: potential conflict of interest. (Valocchi, Beth)
October 1, 2013 Filing 325 STIPULATION of Dismissal by General Dynamics Corporation. (Beste, Robert)
October 1, 2013 Filing 324 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Responses of Defendant Pneumo Abex LLC, Successor in Interest to Abex Corporation, to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories and Plaintiffs' Requests for Admissions and Production (AMENDED NOTICE OF SERVICE regarding supporting documents) re #281 Notice of Service,,,, by Rapid American Corporation. Related document: #281 Notice of Service,,,, filed by Madonna S. Davis, Harry A. Davis.(Reese, C.)
October 1, 2013 Filing 323 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Responses of Defendant Pneumo Abex LLC, Successor in Interest to Abex Corporation, to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories and Plaintiffs' Requests for Admissions and Production re #281 Notice of Service,,,, by Pneumo Abex Corporation. Related document: #281 Notice of Service,,,, filed by Madonna S. Davis, Harry A. Davis.(Reese, C.)
October 1, 2013 Filing 322 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Answers to Plaintiff's Interrogatories, Request for Admissions and Responses to Request for Production to November 4, 2013 - filed by Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Roberts, Sarah)
September 30, 2013 Filing 321 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #283 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Plaintiffs' Failure to Comply with Florida's Asbestos and Silica Compensation Fairness Act filed by Harry A. Davis, Madonna S. Davis.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 10/10/2013. (Hager, Kara)
September 26, 2013 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER: In light of filings found at D.I. 304 and 320, the Oct. 1 teleconference is cancelled. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 9/26/2013. (dlk)
September 26, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED D.I. #320 Stipulation Regarding Certain Discovery filed by United Technologies Corporation. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 9/25/2013. (dlk)
September 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 320 STIPULATION AND ORDER Regarding Certain Discovery Served by Plaintiffs and Plaintiffs' Notices of Defendants' Corporate Representative Depositions by United Technologies Corporation. (Bradley, Paul)
September 24, 2013 Filing 319 Amended Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Robert Bosch LLC. (Culley, David)
September 20, 2013 Filing 318 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Witness and Exhibit List by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company.(Daugherty, Sally)
September 20, 2013 Filing 317 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Witness and Exhibit List by Boeing Co..(Oliva, Jennifer)
September 20, 2013 Filing 316 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Witness And Exhibit List by New Holland North America Inc..(Nolte, R.)
September 20, 2013 Filing 315 Exhibit List by American Honda Motor Company Inc.. (Singewald, Christian)
September 20, 2013 Filing 314 Witness List by American Honda Motor Company Inc.. (Singewald, Christian)
September 20, 2013 Filing 313 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Witness And Exhibit List by Paccar Inc..(Kron, James)
September 20, 2013 Filing 312 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Witness and Exhibit List by Domco Products Texas Inc..(Preston, Willard)
September 20, 2013 Filing 311 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Initial Individual Witness and Exhibit List by CBS Corporation.(Valocchi, Beth)
September 20, 2013 Filing 310 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Initial Individual Witness and Exhibit List by Peerless Industries.(Skiles, Nicholas)
September 20, 2013 Filing 309 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Initial Individual Witness and Exhibit List by Whitney Automotive Group Inc..(Skiles, Nicholas)
September 20, 2013 Filing 308 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Initial Individual Witness and Exhibit List by General Electric Co..(Valocchi, Beth)
September 20, 2013 Filing 307 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Initial Individual Witness and Exhibit List by Eaton Corporation.(Naylor, Joseph)
September 20, 2013 Filing 306 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Initial Individual Witness and Exhibit List by Crane Co..(Skiles, Nicholas)
September 20, 2013 Filing 305 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Witness & Exhibit List by AGCO Corporation.(Roberts, Sarah)
September 20, 2013 Filing 304 Letter to Judge Christopher J. Burke from David G. Culley, Esquire regarding global resolution of pending discovery matters. (Culley, David)
September 20, 2013 Filing 303 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Witness List by National Automotive Parts Association.(Bradley, Paul)
September 20, 2013 Filing 302 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Exhibit List by National Automotive Parts Association.(Bradley, Paul)
September 20, 2013 Filing 301 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Witness List by Genuine Parts Company.(Bradley, Paul)
September 20, 2013 Filing 300 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Exhibit List by Genuine Parts Company.(Bradley, Paul)
September 20, 2013 Filing 299 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Witness and Exhibit Lists by United Technologies Corporation.(Bradley, Paul)
September 20, 2013 Filing 298 Exhibit List by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE)(Singewald, Christian)
September 20, 2013 Filing 297 Witness List by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE)(Singewald, Christian)
September 20, 2013 Filing 296 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Witness List and Exhibit List by Rheem Manufacturing Company.(Parshall, Jonathan)
September 20, 2013 Filing 295 NOTICE of SERVICE of Initial Witness & Exhibit Lists by Advance Auto Parts Inc. (Faben, Peter)
September 20, 2013 Filing 294 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Witness & Exhibit List by Trane US Inc..(Roberts, Sarah)
September 20, 2013 Filing 293 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Witness & Exhibit List by Carrier Corporation.(Roberts, Sarah)
September 20, 2013 Filing 292 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Witness & Exhibit List by Kaiser Gypsum Company Inc..(Roberts, Sarah)
September 20, 2013 Filing 291 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Witness & Exhibit List by Lockheed Martin Corporation.(Roberts, Sarah)
September 20, 2013 Filing 290 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Individual Witness and Exhibit Lists by Pneumo Abex Corporation.(Reese, C.)
September 19, 2013 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER: In light of Defendant Robert Bosch, LLC's ("Robert Bosch")'s D.I. #286 MOTION for Discovery for Teleconference to resolve dispute and the Court's understanding that Robert Bosch's request to stay an October 1, 2013 deposition of its 30(b)(6) witness and discovery responses due October 3, 2013 is based, in large part, on the issues raised in Defendants' joint Motion to Stay All Discovery and Pretrial Deadlines (D.I. 287), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: Robert Bosch may file a letter brief of no more than 3 single-spaced pages raising any additional issues pertinent to its request to stay no later than September 20, 2013. Plaintiffs may respond to Defendants' Motion to Stay All Discovery and Robert Bosch's letter brief (if any) by filing a letter brief of no more than 5 single-spaced pages by no later than September 25, 2013. Defendants' may jointly submit a reply letter brief of no more than 3 single-spaced pages by no later than September 30, 2013. The Court will hear argument on the motions during the teleconference scheduled for October 1, 2013. The Court DENIES Robert Bosch's request to stay certain discovery matters prior to receiving the parties' submissions and hearing argument from the parties on the October 1 teleconference. The briefing schedule set out in this Oral Order as to the resolution of these motions supersedes the briefing procedures referenced in paragraph 7 of the Scheduling Order in this case (D.I. 161). Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 09/19/2013. (mlc)
September 18, 2013 Filing 289 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Columbia Boiler Company Of Pottstown's Initial Witness & Exhibit Lists by Columbia Boiler Company.(Ford, Eileen)
September 18, 2013 Filing 288 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Superior Boiler Works, Inc.'s Initial Witness & Exhibit Lists by Superior Boiler Works Inc..(Ford, Eileen)
September 18, 2013 Filing 287 MOTION to Stay All Discovery and Pretrial Deadlines - filed by United Technologies Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certification of P. Bradley, Esq. in accordance with U.S.D.C. Rule 7.1.1)Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(Bradley, Paul)
September 18, 2013 Filing 286 MOTION for Discovery for Teleconference to resolve dispute - filed by Robert Bosch LLC. Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(Culley, David)
September 17, 2013 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER: The Scheduling Order in this case found at D.I. #161 shall be amended to include the following regarding Cross-Claims. All defendants or third party defendants shall be deemed to have asserted cross-claims for contribution and/or indemnification against all defendants and third party defendants. No answer to any cross-claim for contribution and/or indemnification need be filed by any defendant or third party defendant in this case and all such cross-claims shall be deemed denied. This protocol, as incorporated in the Case Scheduling Order, shall be applicable to all defendants regardless of when their appearance is entered in the case. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 9/17/2013. (dlk)
September 16, 2013 Filing 285 NOTICE OF SERVICE of General Dynamics Corporation's Designation of Individual and Expert Witnesses by General Dynamics Corporation.(Beste, Robert)
September 12, 2013 Filing 284 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #283 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Plaintiffs' Failure to Comply with Florida's Asbestos and Silica Compensation Fairness Act filed by Genuine Parts Company, National Automotive Parts Association, United Technologies Corporation.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 9/30/2013. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Bradley, Paul)
September 12, 2013 Filing 283 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Plaintiffs' Failure to Comply with Florida's Asbestos and Silica Compensation Fairness Act - filed by Genuine Parts Company, National Automotive Parts Association, United Technologies Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(Bradley, Paul)
September 6, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED D.I. #260 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Laura Patricia Yee filed by Lockheed Martin Corporation. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 9/6/2013. (dlk)
September 5, 2013 Filing 282 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Requests for Admission, Requests for Production and Interrogatories directed to Defendant Union Carbide Corporation by Harry A. Davis, Madonna S. Davis.(Hager, Kara)
September 5, 2013 Filing 281 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Requests for Admission, Requests for Production and Interrogatories directed to Defendants Ace Hardware Corporation, Advanced Auto Parts, Inc., Autozone, Inc., Genuine Parts Company, General Parts, Inc., Crane Co., Dana Companies, LLC, Columbia Boiler Co., CBS Corporation; Georgia Pacific, LLC; BorgWarner Morse Tec, Inc.; Ford Motor Company; American Honda Motor Co.; Boeing Co.; General Dynamics; York International Corporation; Whitney Automotive Group; United Technologies Corporation; Trane US, Inc.; Superior Boiler Works, Inc.; Robert Bosch, LLC; Rheem Manufactguring Company; Pneumo Abex Corporation; Peerless Industries; National Automotive Parts Association; Paccar, Inc.; CNH America LLC; New Holland North America, Inc.; Massey Ferguson Co.; Great Dane Limited Partnership; Cummins, Inc.; Honeywell International, Inc.; Lennox Industries, Inc.; Kohler Co.; AGCO Corporation; Carlisle Companies Incorporated; General Electric Co.; Domco Products, LLP; H.B. Fuller Company; Lockheed Martin Corporation by Harry A. Davis, Madonna S. Davis.(Hager, Kara)
September 4, 2013 Filing 280 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Witness of Union Carbide Corporation by Harry A. Davis.(Hager, Kara)
September 4, 2013 Filing 279 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Witness of SOCO WEST INC. by Harry A. Davis.(Hager, Kara)
September 4, 2013 Filing 278 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Witness of Whitney Automotive Group on October 1, 2013 by Harry A. Davis.(Hager, Kara)
September 4, 2013 Filing 277 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Witness of Robert Bosch on October 1, 2013 by Harry A. Davis.(Hager, Kara)
September 4, 2013 Filing 276 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Witness of New Holland North America on October 1, 2013 by Harry A. Davis.(Hager, Kara)
September 4, 2013 Filing 275 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Witness of Massey Ferguson Co. on October 1, 2013 by Harry A. Davis.(Hager, Kara)
September 3, 2013 Filing 274 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Witness of Cummins Inc. on September 30, 2013 by Harry A. Davis.(Hager, Kara)
September 3, 2013 Filing 273 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Witness of CNH America LLC on September 30, 2013 by Harry A. Davis.(Hager, Kara)
September 3, 2013 Filing 272 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Witness of Boeing Co. on September 30, 2013 by Harry A. Davis.(Hager, Kara)
September 3, 2013 Filing 271 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Witness of AGCO Corporation on September 30, 2013 by Harry A. Davis.(Hager, Kara)
September 3, 2013 Filing 270 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Witness of Honeywell International, Inc. on September 30, 2013 by Harry A. Davis.(Hager, Kara)
September 3, 2013 Filing 269 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Witness of Genuine Parts Company on September 30, 2013 by Harry A. Davis.(Hager, Kara)
September 3, 2013 Filing 268 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Witness of United Technologies Corporation by Harry A. Davis.(Hager, Kara)
September 3, 2013 Filing 267 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Witness of John Deere Company by Harry A. Davis.(Hager, Kara)
September 3, 2013 Filing 266 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Ace Hardware Corporation by Harry A. Davis.(Hager, Kara)
September 3, 2013 Filing 265 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Witness of H.B. Fuller Company on September 30, 2013 by Harry A. Davis.(Hager, Kara)
September 3, 2013 Filing 264 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Witness of Lockheed Martin Corporation on September 30, 2013 by Harry A. Davis.(Hager, Kara)
September 3, 2013 Filing 263 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Witness of Lockheed Martin Corporation on September 30, 2013 by Harry A. Davis.(Hager, Kara)
August 21, 2013 Filing 262 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance of Jeffrey S. Marlin, Esquire as counsel for Columbia Boiler Company of Pottstown (Incorrectly named as Columbia Boiler Company) by Columbia Boiler Company (Ford, Eileen)
August 21, 2013 Filing 261 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kyle Eiselstein - filed by Autozone Inc.. Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(Murphy, Peter)
August 21, 2013 Filing 260 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Laura Patricia Yee - filed by Lockheed Martin Corporation. Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(Della Porta, Armand)
August 19, 2013 Filing 259 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Ross Silverman on behalf of Georgia Pacific LLC (Silverman, Andrew)
August 9, 2013 Filing 258 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Harry A. Davis on August 21, 2013 at 9:00 am CDT by United Technologies Corporation.(Bradley, Paul)
August 9, 2013 Filing 257 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Harry Davis on August 21, 2013 by Harry A. Davis, Madonna S. Davis.(Hager, Kara)
August 1, 2013 Filing 256 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan Patrick Smith on behalf of Boeing Company, Boeing Co., Boeing Co, Boeing Company, The Boeing Company (Smith, Bryan)
July 26, 2013 Filing 255 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Objections and Responses to United Technologies Corporation's Bankruptcy Trust-Related Requests for Admission re #253 Notice of Service by Harry A. Davis, Madonna S. Davis. Related document: #253 Notice of Service filed by United Technologies Corporation.(Hager, Kara)
July 25, 2013 Filing 254 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Responses to United Technologies Corporation's Product Identification Requests for Admission re #252 Notice of Service by Harry A. Davis, Madonna S. Davis. Related document: #252 Notice of Service filed by United Technologies Corporation.(Hager, Kara)
July 25, 2013 Filing 253 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Bankruptcy Trust-Related Requests for Admission Directed to Plaintiffs by United Technologies Corporation.(Bradley, Paul)
July 25, 2013 Filing 252 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Product Identification Requests for Admission Directed to Plaintiffs by United Technologies Corporation.(Bradley, Paul)
July 22, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED D.I. #240 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kevin McCoy filed by Union Carbide Corporation. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 7/22/2013. (dlk)
July 15, 2013 Filing 251 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Kaiser Gypsum Company Inc.. (Roberts, Sarah)
July 15, 2013 Filing 250 Witness List by United Technologies Corporation. (Bradley, Paul)
July 12, 2013 Filing 249 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter S. Murphy on behalf of CNH America LLC (Murphy, Peter)
July 11, 2013 Filing 248 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Harry A. Davis on August 21, 2013 by Harry A. Davis, Madonna S. Davis.(Hager, Kara)
June 28, 2013 Filing 247 Witness List by Harry A. Davis, Madonna S. Davis. (Hager, Kara)
June 28, 2013 Filing 246 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Plaintiff Harry A. Davis on August 21, 2013 at 9:00 a.m. (CDT) by United Technologies Corporation.(Bradley, Paul)
June 21, 2013 Filing 245 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Edward M. Newsom, Esquire - filed by Autozone Inc.. Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(Murphy, Peter)
June 20, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED D.I. #243 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Frank C. Bedinger, III filed by Rheem Manufacturing Company, D.I. #238 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jason Weiner, Esquire filed by Madonna S. Davis, Harry A. Davis, and D.I. #234 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Lance D. Wilson filed by United Technologies Corporation. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 6/20/2013. (dlk)
June 19, 2013 Filing 244 ANSWER to #25 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim Past, Present and Future by Any Co-Defendant by John Deere Company.(Guerke, Kevin)
June 19, 2013 Filing 243 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Frank C. Bedinger, III - filed by Rheem Manufacturing Company. Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(Parshall, Jonathan)
June 19, 2013 Filing 242 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Deborah M. Parker, Esquire - filed by Lockheed Martin Corporation. Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(Della Porta, Armand)
June 18, 2013 Filing 241 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Harry A. Davis on June 19, 2013 by Harry A. Davis, Madonna S. Davis.(Hager, Kara)
June 18, 2013 Filing 240 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kevin McCoy - filed by Union Carbide Corporation. Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(Valocchi, Beth)
June 18, 2013 Filing 239 AMENDED DOCUMENT by United Technologies Corporation. Amendment to #227 Notice to Take Deposition of Plaintiff Harry A. Davis (amended to reflect time zone change only). (Bradley, Paul)
June 17, 2013 Filing 238 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jason Weiner, Esquire - filed by Harry A. Davis, Madonna S. Davis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certification of Jason Weiner, Esquire)Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(Hager, Kara)
June 17, 2013 Filing 237 ANSWER to #163 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #132 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #39 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #93 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #49 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #228 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #159 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #25 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #125 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #79 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, #38 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #87 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #150 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #52 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #151 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #207 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, 67 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #40 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #66 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim , ANSWER to #163 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #132 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #39 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #93 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #49 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #228 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #159 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #25 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #125 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #79 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, #38 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #87 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #150 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #52 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #151 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #207 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, 67 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #40 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #66 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim , ANSWER to #163 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #132 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #39 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #93 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #49 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #228 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #159 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #25 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #125 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #79 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, #38 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #87 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #150 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #52 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #151 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #207 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, 67 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #40 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #66 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim , ANSWER to #163 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #132 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #39 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #93 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #49 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #228 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #159 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #25 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #125 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #79 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, #38 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #87 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #150 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #52 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #151 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #207 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, 67 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #40 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #66 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim , ANSWER to #163 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #132 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #39 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #93 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #49 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #228 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #159 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #25 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #125 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #79 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, #38 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #87 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #150 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #52 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #151 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #207 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, 67 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #40 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #66 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim , ANSWER to #163 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #132 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #39 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #93 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #49 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #228 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #159 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #25 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #125 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #79 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, #38 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #87 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #150 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #52 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #151 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #207 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, 67 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #40 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #66 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim , ANSWER to #163 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #132 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #39 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #93 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #49 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #228 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #159 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #25 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #125 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #79 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, #38 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #87 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #150 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #52 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #151 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #207 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, 67 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #40 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #66 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim , ANSWER to #163 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #132 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #39 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #93 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #49 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #228 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #159 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #25 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #125 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #79 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, #38 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #87 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #150 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #52 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #151 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #207 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, 67 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #40 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #66 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim , ANSWER to #163 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #132 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #39 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #93 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #49 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #228 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #159 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #25 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #125 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #79 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, #38 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #87 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #150 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #52 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #151 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #207 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, 67 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #40 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #66 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim , ANSWER to #163 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #132 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #39 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #93 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #49 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #228 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #159 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #25 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #125 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #79 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, #38 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #87 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #150 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #52 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #151 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #207 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, 67 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #40 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #66 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim , ANSWER to #163 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #132 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #39 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #93 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #49 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #228 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #159 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #25 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #125 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #79 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, #38 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #87 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #150 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #52 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #151 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #207 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, 67 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #40 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #66 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim , ANSWER to #163 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #132 Answer to Comp
June 17, 2013 Filing 236 ANSWER to #163 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #132 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #39 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #93 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #49 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #228 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #159 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #25 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #125 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #79 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, #38 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #87 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #150 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #52 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #151 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #207 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, 67 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #40 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #66 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim , ANSWER to #163 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #132 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #39 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #93 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #49 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #228 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #159 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #25 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #125 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #79 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, #38 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #87 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #150 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #52 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #151 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #207 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, 67 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #40 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #66 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim , ANSWER to #163 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #132 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #39 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #93 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #49 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #228 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #159 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #25 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #125 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #79 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, #38 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #87 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #150 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #52 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #151 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #207 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, 67 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #40 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #66 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim , ANSWER to #163 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #132 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #39 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #93 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #49 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #228 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #159 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #25 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #125 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #79 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, #38 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #87 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #150 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #52 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #151 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #207 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, 67 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #40 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #66 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim , ANSWER to #163 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #132 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #39 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #93 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #49 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #228 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #159 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #25 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #125 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #79 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, #38 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #87 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #150 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #52 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #151 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #207 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, 67 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #40 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #66 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim , ANSWER to #163 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #132 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #39 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #93 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #49 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #228 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #159 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #25 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #125 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #79 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, #38 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #87 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #150 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #52 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #151 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #207 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, 67 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #40 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #66 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim , ANSWER to #163 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #132 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #39 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #93 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #49 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #228 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #159 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #25 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #125 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #79 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, #38 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #87 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #150 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #52 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #151 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #207 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, 67 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #40 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #66 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim , ANSWER to #163 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #132 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #39 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #93 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #49 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #228 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #159 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #25 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #125 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #79 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, #38 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #87 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #150 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #52 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #151 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #207 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, 67 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #40 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #66 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim , ANSWER to #163 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #132 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #39 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #93 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #49 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #228 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #159 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #25 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #125 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #79 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, #38 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #87 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #150 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #52 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #151 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #207 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, 67 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #40 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #66 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim , ANSWER to #163 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #132 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #39 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #93 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #49 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #228 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #159 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #25 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #125 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #79 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, #38 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #87 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #150 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #52 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #151 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #207 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, 67 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #40 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #66 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim , ANSWER to #163 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #132 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #39 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #93 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #49 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #228 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #159 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #25 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #125 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #79 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, #38 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #87 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #150 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #52 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #151 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #207 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, 67 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #40 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #66 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim , ANSWER to #163 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #132 Answer to Comp
June 17, 2013 Filing 235 ANSWER to #163 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #132 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #39 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #93 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #49 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #228 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #159 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #25 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #125 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #79 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, #38 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #87 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #150 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #52 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #151 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #207 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, 67 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #40 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #66 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim , ANSWER to #163 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #132 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #39 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #93 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #49 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #228 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #159 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #25 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #125 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #79 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, #38 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #87 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #150 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #52 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #151 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #207 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, 67 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #40 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #66 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim , ANSWER to #163 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #132 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #39 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #93 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #49 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #228 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #159 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #25 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #125 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #79 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, #38 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #87 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #150 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #52 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #151 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #207 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, 67 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #40 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #66 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim , ANSWER to #163 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #132 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #39 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #93 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #49 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #228 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #159 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #25 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #125 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #79 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, #38 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #87 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #150 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #52 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #151 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #207 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, 67 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #40 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #66 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim , ANSWER to #163 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #132 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #39 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #93 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #49 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #228 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #159 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #25 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #125 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #79 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, #38 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #87 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #150 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #52 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #151 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #207 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, 67 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #40 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #66 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim , ANSWER to #163 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #132 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #39 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #93 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #49 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #228 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #159 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #25 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #125 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #79 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, #38 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #87 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #150 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #52 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #151 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #207 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, 67 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #40 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #66 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim , ANSWER to #163 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #132 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #39 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #93 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #49 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #228 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #159 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #25 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #125 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #79 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, #38 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #87 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #150 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #52 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #151 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #207 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, 67 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #40 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #66 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim , ANSWER to #163 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #132 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #39 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #93 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #49 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #228 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #159 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #25 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #125 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #79 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, #38 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #87 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #150 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #52 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #151 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #207 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, 67 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #40 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #66 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim , ANSWER to #163 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #132 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #39 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #93 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #49 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #228 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #159 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #25 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #125 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #79 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, #38 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #87 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #150 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #52 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #151 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #207 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, 67 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #40 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #66 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim , ANSWER to #163 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #132 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #39 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #93 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #49 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #228 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #159 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #25 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #125 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #79 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, #38 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #87 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #150 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #52 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #151 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #207 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, 67 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #40 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #66 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim , ANSWER to #163 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #132 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #39 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #93 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #49 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #228 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #159 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #25 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #125 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #79 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, #38 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #87 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #150 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #52 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #151 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #207 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, 67 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #40 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #66 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim , ANSWER to #163 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #132 Answer to Comp
June 17, 2013 Filing 234 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Lance D. Wilson - filed by United Technologies Corporation. Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(Bradley, Paul)
June 14, 2013 Filing 233 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Marcia Eason - filed by Autozone Inc.. Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(Murphy, Peter)
June 12, 2013 Filing 232 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosure by AGCO Corporation.(Tyler, Jessica)
June 12, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED D.I. #230 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Holly A. Hempel filed by John Deere Company. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 6/12/2013. (dlk)
June 11, 2013 Filing 231 NOTICE OF SERVICE of of Defendant Robert Bosch LLC's Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures by Robert Bosch LLC.(Culley, David)
June 11, 2013 Filing 230 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Holly A. Hempel - filed by John Deere Company. Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(Guerke, Kevin)
June 6, 2013 Filing 229 NOTICE of Service of Plaintiff's Responses Deere & Companys First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents and Things by Harry A. Davis (Hager, Kara)
June 5, 2013 Filing 228 ANSWER to Complaint with Trial by Jury of Twelve Demanded , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by American Honda Motor Company Inc..(Singewald, Christian)
June 4, 2013 Corporate Affiliates/Parents added per Disclosure Statement: identifying Corporate Parent Kaiser Cement Corporation, Corporate Parent Hanson Permanente Cement, Inc. for Kaiser Gypsum Company Inc.. (Roberts, Sarah)
May 31, 2013 Filing 227 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Harry A. Davis on June 19, 2013 by United Technologies Corporation.(Bradley, Paul)
May 31, 2013 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT NOTICE: In conjunction with the disclosure statement docketed in this action (SEE DI#224 , corporate parents and other affiliates should be added to the case. The event code ADD CORPORATE AFFILIATES/PARENTS, found in the OTHER DOCUMENTS list, should be used to add this information. (rwc)
May 30, 2013 Filing 226 INITIAL DISCLOSURES pursuant to Rule 26 by Carrier Corporation.(Roberts, Sarah)
May 30, 2013 Filing 225 INITIAL DISCLOSURES pursuant to Rule 26 by Kaiser Gypsum Company Inc..(Roberts, Sarah)
May 30, 2013 Filing 224 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Kaiser Gypsum Company Inc.. (Roberts, Sarah)
May 30, 2013 Filing 223 INITIAL DISCLOSURES pursuant to Rule 26 by Lockheed Martin Corporation.(Roberts, Sarah)
May 30, 2013 Filing 222 INITIAL DISCLOSURES pursuant to Rule 26 by Trane US Inc..(Roberts, Sarah)
May 17, 2013 Filing 221 NOTICE of Appearance by Joel M. Doner on behalf of H.B. Fuller Company (Doner, Joel)
May 16, 2013 Corporate Affiliates/Parents added per Disclosure Statement: identifying Corporate Parent CNH America LLC for CNH America LLC. (Tome, Brian)
May 16, 2013 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT NOTICE: In conjunction with the disclosure statement docketed in this action (SEE DI#219 , corporate parents and other affiliates should be added to the case. The event code ADD CORPORATE AFFILIATES/PARENTS, found in the OTHER DOCUMENTS list, should be used to add this information. (rwc)
May 15, 2013 Filing 220 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Federal Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosure by CNH America LLC.(Tome, Brian)
May 15, 2013 Filing 219 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by CNH America LLC. (Tome, Brian)
May 15, 2013 Filing 218 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Tome on behalf of CNH America LLC (Tome, Brian)
May 9, 2013 Filing 217 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosure by New Holland North America Inc..(Nolte, R.)
May 9, 2013 Filing 216 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by AGCO Corporation identifying Corporate Parent BlackRock, Inc. for AGCO Corporation.. (Tyler, Jessica)
May 9, 2013 Filing 215 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Tyler, Jessica)
May 8, 2013 Filing 214 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company.(Daugherty, Sally)
May 8, 2013 Filing 213 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Carrier Corporation identifying Corporate Parent United Technologies Corp. for Carrier Corporation.. (Tyler, Jessica)
May 8, 2013 Filing 212 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Trane US Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Ingersoll-Rand PLC for Trane US Inc... (Tyler, Jessica)
May 7, 2013 Filing 211 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Brian L. Kasprzak, Esquire as co-counsel.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Mantzavinos, Megan)
May 3, 2013 Filing 210 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Anne Roberts on behalf of AGCO Corporation (Roberts, Sarah)
May 3, 2013 Filing 209 NOTICE of SERVICE of F.R.C.P. Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures by Massey Ferguson Co. (Fruehauf, Barbara)
May 3, 2013 Filing 208 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Massey Ferguson Co. identifying Corporate Parent TRW Automotive Holdings Corporation for Massey Ferguson Co... (Fruehauf, Barbara)
May 3, 2013 Filing 207 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Massey Ferguson Co.. (Fruehauf, Barbara)
May 2, 2013 Filing 206 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures by BorgWarner Morse Tec Inc..(Donelson, Matthew)
May 2, 2013 Filing 205 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Kohler Co.'s Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures by Kohler Co..(Bocchino, Amaryah)
May 1, 2013 Filing 204 NOTICE of SERVICE of F.R.C.P Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures by Great Dane Limited Partnership (Fruehauf, Barbara)
May 1, 2013 Filing 203 NOTICE of SERVICE of F.R.C.P Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures by Lennox Industries Inc. (Fruehauf, Barbara)
May 1, 2013 Filing 202 NOTICE of SERVICE of F.R.C.P Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures by Cummins Inc. (Fruehauf, Barbara)
May 1, 2013 Filing 200 NOTICE of Initial Federal Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosure by York International Corporation (Murphy, Peter)
May 1, 2013 Filing 199 NOTICE of Change of Address by Peter S. Murphy (Murphy, Peter)
May 1, 2013 CORRECTING ENTRY: Docket entry made at D.I. 201 on 5/1/13 has been removed as the entry was correctly made at D.I. 202. (dlk)
April 30, 2013 Filing 198 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant AutoZone, Inc.'s Federal Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures by Autozone Inc..(Murphy, Peter)
April 30, 2013 Filing 197 NOTICE of Change of Address by Peter S. Murphy (Murphy, Peter)
April 30, 2013 Filing 196 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a) Initial Disclosures re #64 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #1 Notice of Removal, by Paccar Inc.. Related document: #64 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Paccar Inc., #1 Notice of Removal, filed by United Technologies Corporation.(Kron, James)
April 30, 2013 Filing 195 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26 (a)(1) Initial Disclosures by Superior Boiler Works Inc..(Mantzavinos, Megan)
April 30, 2013 Filing 194 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26 (a)(1) Initial Disclosures by Columbia Boiler Company.(Ford, Eileen)
April 30, 2013 Filing 193 Amended Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Carlisle Companies Incorporated identifying Other Affiliate Carlisle Industrial Brake and Friction Inc. for Carlisle Companies Incorporated.. (Daly, Daniel)
April 30, 2013 Filing 192 NOTICE of Service for Rule 26(a) Initial Disclosures by Ace Hardware Corporation (Sunshine, Paul)
April 30, 2013 Filing 191 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26 (a)(1) Initial Disclosures by General Dynamics Corporation.(Beste, Robert)
April 30, 2013 Filing 190 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a) Initial Disclosures by Honeywell International Inc..(Florax, Joelle)
April 30, 2013 CORRECTING ENTRY: D.I. 191 has been removed from the docket -- Pursuant to L.R. 5.4 and consistent with Fed. R. Civ. P. 5(a), in cases where all parties are represented by counsel, all requests for discovery under Fed. R. Civ.P. 26, 30, 31, 33 through 36 and 45, and answers and responses thereto, and all required disclosures under Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a), shall be served upon other counsel or parties but shall not be filed with the Court. In lieu thereof, the party requesting discovery and the party serving responses thereto shall file with the Court a Notice of Service containing a certification that a particular form of discovery or response was served on other counsel or opposing parties, and the date and manner of service. (dlk)
April 30, 2013 CORRECTING ENTRY: Entries filed at D.I. Nos. 162, 169, 181, 182, 186 and 187 have been corrected -- Pursuant to L.R. 5.4 and consistent with Fed. R. Civ. P. 5(a), in cases where all parties are represented by counsel, all requests for discovery under Fed. R. Civ.P. 26, 30, 31, 33 through 36 and 45, and answers and responses thereto, and all required disclosures under Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a), shall be served upon other counsel or parties but shall not be filed with the Court. In lieu thereof, the party requesting discovery and the party serving responses thereto shall file with the Court a Notice of Service containing a certification that a particular form of discovery or response was served on other counsel or opposing parties, and the date and manner of service. (dlk)
April 30, 2013 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT NOTICE: In conjunction with the disclosure statement docketed in this action (SEE DI#170 ), corporate parents and other affiliates should be added to the case. The event code ADD CORPORATE AFFILIATES/PARENTS, found in the OTHER DOCUMENTS list, should be used to add this information. (rwc)
April 29, 2013 Filing 189 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Georgia-Pacific LLC's Initial Disclosures by Georgia Pacific LLC.(Bocchino, Amaryah)
April 29, 2013 Filing 188 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Federal Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures by General Parts Inc..(Reid, Donald)
April 29, 2013 Filing 187 Notice of INITIAL DISCLOSURES pursuant to Rule 26 by Superior Boiler Works Inc..(Ford, Eileen) Modified on 4/30/2013 (dlk).
April 29, 2013 Filing 186 Notice of INITIAL DISCLOSURES pursuant to Rule 26 by Columbia Boiler Company.(Ford, Eileen) Modified on 4/30/2013 (dlk).
April 29, 2013 Filing 185 NOTICE of SERVICE of F.R.C.P. Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures by Advance Auto Parts Inc. (Faben, Peter)
April 29, 2013 Filing 184 NOTICE OF SERVICE of initial disclosures pursuant to Rule 26(a)(1) by Peerless Industries.(Skiles, Nicholas)
April 29, 2013 Filing 183 NOTICE OF SERVICE of The Boeing Company's Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures by Boeing Co..(Oliva, Jennifer)
April 29, 2013 Filing 182 Notice of INITIAL DISCLOSURES pursuant to Rule 26 by New Holland North America Inc..(Harmon, Mary Kathryn) Modified on 4/30/2013 (dlk).
April 29, 2013 Filing 181 Notice of INITIAL DISCLOSURES pursuant to Rule 26 by Harry A. Davis, Madonna S. Davis.(Hager, Kara) Modified on 4/30/2013 (dlk).
April 29, 2013 Filing 180 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Deere & Company's Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures, Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories, and Respnses to Plaintiffs' Request for Production by John Deere Company.(Guerke, Kevin)
April 29, 2013 Filing 179 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures pursuant to Rule 26(a)(l) by Eaton Corporation.(Naylor, Joseph)
April 29, 2013 Filing 178 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures pursuant to Rule 26(a)(l) by Whitney Automotive Group Inc..(Skiles, Nicholas)
April 29, 2013 Filing 177 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures pursuant to Rule 26(a)(l) by Crane Co..(Skiles, Nicholas)
April 29, 2013 Filing 176 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures pursuant to Rule 26(a)(1) by Domco Products LLP.(Preston, Willard)
April 29, 2013 Filing 175 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures pursuant to Rule 26(a)(l) by CBS Corporation.(Valocchi, Beth)
April 29, 2013 Filing 174 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures pursuant to Rule 26(a)(l) by Union Carbide Corporation.(Valocchi, Beth)
April 29, 2013 Filing 173 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures pursuant to Rule 26(a)(l) by General Electric Co..(Valocchi, Beth)
April 29, 2013 Filing 172 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures pursuant to Rule 26(a)(l) by Dana Companies LLC.(Valocchi, Beth)
April 29, 2013 Filing 171 NOTICE of Service of Rule 26 Initial Disclosure by Carlisle Companies Incorporated (Daly, Daniel)
April 29, 2013 Filing 170 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Carlisle Companies Incorporated. (Daly, Daniel)
April 29, 2013 Filing 169 NOTICE of INITIAL DISCLOSURES pursuant to Rule 26 by Paccar Inc..(Kron, James) Modified on 4/30/2013 (dlk).
April 26, 2013 Filing 168 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures by United Technologies Corporation.(Bradley, Paul)
April 26, 2013 Filing 167 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures by National Automotive Parts Association.(Bradley, Paul)
April 26, 2013 Filing 166 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures by Genuine Parts Company.(Bradley, Paul)
April 26, 2013 Filing 165 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Deere & Company's Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' Requests for Admissions by John Deere Company.(Guerke, Kevin)
April 26, 2013 CORRECTING ENTRY: D.I. 150 and 151 have been corrected to reflect Answers with Crossclaims have been filed by Cummins Inc. and Lennox Industries (dlk)
April 25, 2013 Filing 164 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Great Dane Limited Partnership identifying Corporate Parent CRA Holdings, Inc for Great Dane Limited Partnership.. (Fruehauf, Barbara)
April 25, 2013 Filing 163 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Great Dane Limited Partnership. (Fruehauf, Barbara)
April 25, 2013 Filing 162 NOTICE of INITIAL DISCLOSURES pursuant to Rule 26 by Ford Motor Company.(Singewald, Christian) Modified on 4/30/2013 (dlk).
April 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 161 SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties due by 6/30/2013; Amended Pleadings due by 6/30/2013; Status Report due by 11/19/2013; A Status Teleconference is set for 12/2/2013 at 10:00 AM before Judge Christopher J. Burke; Final Discovery requests due 9/3/2013; Date for Objections to Final Discovery requests due 10/4/13; Dispositive motions due 12/23/2013; Pretrial Conference and Trial dates are to be determined. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 4/22/2013. (dlk)
April 22, 2013 Filing 160 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Advance Auto Parts Inc.. (Faben, Peter)
April 22, 2013 Filing 159 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Advance Auto Parts Inc.. (Faben, Peter)
April 22, 2013 Filing 158 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter John Faben on behalf of Advance Auto Parts Inc. (Faben, Peter)
April 22, 2013 Filing 157 NOTICE of Withdrawl of Appearance by Georgia Pacific LLC, Kohler Co. (Faben, Peter)
April 22, 2013 Filing 156 REPLY BRIEF re #64 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Paccar Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-2 to Reply Brief of Defendant PACCAR Inc)(Kron, James)
April 22, 2013 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Christopher J. Burke - Scheduling Conference held on 4/22/2013. (Court Reporter Bonnie (Hawkins)) (dlk)
April 17, 2013 Filing 155 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Autozone Inc.. (Murphy, Peter)
April 17, 2013 Filing 154 Letter to The Honorable Christopher J. Burke from Paul A. Bradley regarding Proposed Scheduling Order and Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference on April 22, 2013, at 2:00 p.m. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Scheduling Order)(Bradley, Paul)
April 15, 2013 Filing 151 ANSWER to Complaint with CROSSCLAIMS against All Defendants by Lennox Industries Inc..(dlk) Modified on 4/26/2013 (dlk).
April 15, 2013 Filing 150 ANSWER to Complaint with CROSSCLAIMS against All Defendants by Cummins Inc.(dlk) Modified on 4/26/2013 (dlk).
April 15, 2013 Filing 153 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Lennox Industries Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Lennox International Inc. for Lennox Industries Inc... (Fruehauf, Barbara)
April 15, 2013 Filing 152 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Cummins Inc.. (Fruehauf, Barbara)
April 12, 2013 Filing 149 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #64 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Harry A. Davis, Madonna S. Davis.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 4/22/2013. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E)(Hager, Kara)
March 28, 2013 Filing 148 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew P. Donelson on behalf of CNH America LLC (Donelson, Matthew)
March 28, 2013 Filing 147 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Peerless Industries. (Skiles, Nicholas)
March 27, 2013 Corporate Affiliates/Parents added per Disclosure Statement: identifying Other Affiliate State Street Bank and Trust Company for Boeing Co.. (Oliva, Jennifer)
March 26, 2013 Filing 146 Amended Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Boeing Co.. (Oliva, Jennifer)
March 26, 2013 Filing 145 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Admission, First Set of Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents and Things Directed to Deere & Company by Harry A. Davis, Madonna S. Davis.(Hager, Kara)
March 26, 2013 Filing 144 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Responses to Deere & Company's First Set of Requests for Admission re #134 Notice of Service by Harry A. Davis, Madonna S. Davis. Related document: #134 Notice of Service filed by John Deere Company.(Hager, Kara)
March 21, 2013 Filing 143 NOTICE of Appearance by Barbara Anne Fruehauf on behalf of Massey Ferguson Co. (Fruehauf, Barbara)
March 21, 2013 Filing 142 NOTICE of Appearance by Barbara Anne Fruehauf on behalf of Lennox Industries Inc. (Fruehauf, Barbara)
March 21, 2013 Filing 141 NOTICE of Appearance by Barbara Anne Fruehauf on behalf of Great Dane Limited Partnership (Fruehauf, Barbara)
March 21, 2013 Filing 140 NOTICE of Appearance by Barbara Anne Fruehauf on behalf of Cummins Inc. (Fruehauf, Barbara)
March 19, 2013 Filing 139 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL re Boeing Co.: Entry of appearance of attorney Amaryah K. Bocchino. Attorney Christian J. Singewald and Agatha C. Mingos terminated. (Bocchino, Amaryah)
March 19, 2013 Filing 138 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL re Boeing Co.: Entry of appearance of attorney Melissa L. Troutner. Attorney Christian J. Singewald and Agatha C. Mingos terminated. (Troutner, Melissa)
March 19, 2013 Filing 137 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL re Boeing Co.: Entry of appearance of attorney Jennifer Danella Oliva. Attorney Christian J. Singewald and Agatha C. Mingos terminated. (Oliva, Jennifer)
March 19, 2013 Filing 136 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL re Boeing Co.: Entry of appearance of attorney Amaryah K. Bocchino. Attorney Christian J. Singewald and Agatha C. Mingos terminated. (Bocchino, Amaryah)
March 19, 2013 Filing 135 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL re Boeing Co.: Entry of appearance of attorney Jason A. Cincilla. Attorney Christian J. Singewald and Agatha C. Mingos terminated. (Cincilla, Jason)
March 15, 2013 Filing 134 NOTICE OF SERVICE of First Set of Interrogatories; Request for Production of Documents and Things; and First Set of Requests for Admission to Plaintiffs by John Deere Company.(Guerke, Kevin)
March 14, 2013 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT NOTICE: In conjunction with the disclosure statement docketed in this action (SEE DI #133 , corporate parents and other affiliates should be added to the case. The event code ADD CORPORATE AFFILIATES/PARENTS, found in the OTHER DOCUMENTS list, should be used to add this information. (rwc)
March 14, 2013 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b) TELECONFERENCE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: (1) A scheduling teleconference pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) will be held on 4/22/2013, at 2:00 p.m. Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate the call to Chambers of Christopher J. Burke by dialing 302-573-4595.(2) For the purpose of being prepared the parties shall confer regarding proposed dates in the scheduling order and shall submit a proposal to the Court no later than 4/17/2013. The Court's form scheduling order is posted at http://www.ded.uscourts.gov (see Chambers, Judge Burke, Forms). (3) If there are disputed issues between the parties regarding the content of the Scheduling Order, the parties should note those areas of dispute in the Proposed Order, along with their proposals for the language the Court should adopt as to that issue. In addition, the parties may each separately file a letter (of no more than two single-spaced pages) setting forth their position as to these disputed issues. (4) Counsel for Plaintiffs is reminded of their obligation to inform any Defendants who have not yet entered an appearance on this Court's docket about this Order. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 3/14/2013. (dlk)
March 14, 2013 Corporate Affiliates/Parents added per Disclosure Statement: identifying Corporate Parent Johnson Controls, Inc. for York International Corporation. (Murphy, Peter)
March 13, 2013 Filing 133 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by York International Corporation. (Murphy, Peter)
March 13, 2013 Filing 132 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Trial of Twelve Demanded , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by York International Corporation.(Murphy, Peter)
March 13, 2013 Filing 131 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter S. Murphy on behalf of Autozone Inc. (Murphy, Peter)
March 12, 2013 Filing 130 NOTICE of Appearance by Willard F. Preston, III on behalf of Domco Products LLP (Preston, Willard)
March 12, 2013 Filing 129 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Domco Products LLP.(Preston, Willard)
March 12, 2013 Filing 128 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter S. Murphy on behalf of York International Corporation (Murphy, Peter)
March 11, 2013 Filing 127 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew P. Donelson on behalf of BorgWarner Morse Tec Inc. (Donelson, Matthew)
March 11, 2013 Filing 126 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by General Parts Inc.. (Reid, Donald)
March 11, 2013 Filing 125 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (Notice of Removal), CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by General Parts Inc..(Reid, Donald)
March 6, 2013 Filing 124 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Whitney Automotive Group Inc. identifying Other Affiliate U.S. Auto Parts Network, Inc. for Whitney Automotive Group Inc... (Skiles, Nicholas)
March 5, 2013 Filing 123 NOTICE of Appearance by Armand J. Della Porta, Jr on behalf of Trane US Inc. (Della Porta, Armand)
March 5, 2013 Filing 122 NOTICE of Appearance by Armand J. Della Porta, Jr on behalf of AGCO Corporation (Della Porta, Armand)
March 5, 2013 Filing 121 NOTICE of Appearance by Armand J. Della Porta, Jr on behalf of Kaiser Gypsum Company Inc. (Della Porta, Armand)
March 5, 2013 Filing 120 NOTICE of Appearance by Armand J. Della Porta, Jr on behalf of Carrier Corporation (Della Porta, Armand)
March 1, 2013 Filing 119 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on AGCO Corporation; Autozone Inc.; Borgwarner Morse Tec Inc.; Carrier Corporation; CNH America LLC; Crane Co.; Eaton Corporation; Ford Motor Company; General Electric Company; Georgia Pacific LLC; New Holland North America Inc.; Trane US Inc.; Union Carbide Corporation; United Technologies Corporation; York International Corporation on 8/24/2012, filed by Harry A. Davis, Madonna S. Davis. (Hager, Kara)
March 1, 2013 Filing 118 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Ace Hardware Corporation; Boeing Company; CBS Corporation; Honeywell International, Inc.; Lennox Industries, Inc.; Paccar Inc.; Rapid American Corporation; Robert Bosch LLC on 8/27/2012, filed by Harry A. Davis, Madonna S. Davis. (Hager, Kara)
March 1, 2013 Filing 117 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Whitney Automotive Group, Inc. on 8/14/2012, filed by Harry A. Davis, Madonna S. Davis. (Hager, Kara)
March 1, 2013 Filing 116 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Superior Boiler Works, Inc. on 8/13/2012, filed by Harry A. Davis, Madonna S. Davis. (Hager, Kara)
March 1, 2013 Filing 115 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Soco-West, Inc. on 8/14/2012, filed by Harry A. Davis, Madonna S. Davis. (Hager, Kara)
March 1, 2013 Filing 114 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Rheem Manufacturing Company on 8/27/2012, filed by Harry A. Davis, Madonna S. Davis. (Hager, Kara)
March 1, 2013 Filing 113 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Pneumo Abex Corporation on 8/28/2012, filed by Harry A. Davis, Madonna S. Davis. (Hager, Kara)
March 1, 2013 Filing 112 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Peerless Industries, Inc. on 8/14/2012, filed by Harry A. Davis, Madonna S. Davis. (Hager, Kara)
March 1, 2013 Filing 111 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on National Automotive Parts Association on 8/17/2012, filed by Harry A. Davis, Madonna S. Davis. (Hager, Kara)
March 1, 2013 Filing 110 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Metropolitan Life Insurance Company on 8/28/2012, filed by Harry A. Davis, Madonna S. Davis. (Hager, Kara)
March 1, 2013 Filing 109 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Massey Ferguson Co. on 8/27/2012, filed by Harry A. Davis, Madonna S. Davis. (Hager, Kara)
March 1, 2013 Filing 108 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Lockheed Martin Corp. on 8/13/2012, filed by Harry A. Davis, Madonna S. Davis. (Hager, Kara)
March 1, 2013 Filing 107 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Kohler Co. on 8/14/2012, filed by Harry A. Davis, Madonna S. Davis. (Hager, Kara)
March 1, 2013 Filing 106 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc. on 8/13/2012, filed by Harry A. Davis, Madonna S. Davis. (Hager, Kara)
March 1, 2013 Filing 105 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on John Deere Company on 8/15/2012, filed by Harry A. Davis, Madonna S. Davis. (Hager, Kara)
March 1, 2013 Filing 104 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on HB Fuller Co. on 8/14/2012, filed by Harry A. Davis, Madonna S. Davis. (Hager, Kara)
March 1, 2013 Filing 103 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Genuine Parts Company on 8/17/2012, filed by Harry A. Davis, Madonna S. Davis. (Hager, Kara)
March 1, 2013 Filing 102 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on General Parts, Inc. on 8/14/2012, filed by Harry A. Davis, Madonna S. Davis. (Hager, Kara)
March 1, 2013 Filing 101 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on General Dynamics Corp on 8/13/2012, filed by Harry A. Davis, Madonna S. Davis. (Hager, Kara)
March 1, 2013 Filing 100 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Domco Products Texas, L.P. on 8/14/2012, filed by Harry A. Davis, Madonna S. Davis. (Hager, Kara)
March 1, 2013 Filing 99 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Dana Companies LLC on 8/14/2012, filed by Harry A. Davis, Madonna S. Davis. (Hager, Kara)
March 1, 2013 Filing 98 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Columbia Boiler Co. on 8/15/2012, filed by Harry A. Davis, Madonna S. Davis. (Hager, Kara)
March 1, 2013 Filing 97 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Carlisle Companies Inc. on 8/28/2012, filed by Harry A. Davis, Madonna S. Davis. (Hager, Kara)
March 1, 2013 Filing 96 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on American Honda Motor Corp. on 8/14/2012, filed by Harry A. Davis, Madonna S. Davis. (Hager, Kara)
March 1, 2013 Filing 95 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Advance Auto Parts Inc. on August 22, 2012, filed by Harry A. Davis, Madonna S. Davis. (Hager, Kara)
February 28, 2013 Filing 94 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph S. Naylor on behalf of Eaton Corporation (Naylor, Joseph)
February 27, 2013 Filing 93 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), CROSSCLAIM against All Parties by Whitney Automotive Group Inc.. (Skiles, Nicholas)
February 26, 2013 Filing 92 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Crane Co.. (Skiles, Nicholas)
February 25, 2013 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: For those Defendants who have been served, but for whom counsel of record has not entered an appearance on the Court's docket, if Plaintiffs have not entered an affidavit of service for that Defendant on the docket, Plaintiffs shall do so by March 1, 2013. The affidavit shall indicate, at a minimum, the date upon which service was perfected or upon which service was waived by the Defendant at issue. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 2/25/2013. (dlk)
February 22, 2013 Filing 91 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's First Amended Answers to United Technologies Corporation's First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents re #75 Notice (Other) by Harry A. Davis, Madonna S. Davis. Related document: #75 Notice (Other) filed by Madonna S. Davis, Harry A. Davis.(Hager, Kara)
February 22, 2013 Filing 90 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Medical Records by Harry A. Davis, Madonna S. Davis.(Hager, Kara)
February 22, 2013 Filing 89 NOTICE of Service of Plaintiff's Executed Authorizations by Harry A. Davis, Madonna S. Davis (Hager, Kara)
February 21, 2013 Filing 88 NOTICE OF SERVICE of First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiffs, First Request for Production of Documents and Things to Plaintiffs and First Requests for Admission to Plaintiffs by Boeing Co..(Singewald, Christian)
February 21, 2013 Filing 87 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Carlisle Companies Incorporated. (Daly, Daniel)
February 20, 2013 Filing 86 STATUS REPORT by United Technologies Corporation. (Bradley, Paul)
February 19, 2013 Filing 85 STATUS REPORT by Harry A. Davis, Madonna S. Davis. (Hager, Kara)
February 19, 2013 Filing 84 STATEMENT re #76 Order, by Peerless Industries. (Skiles, Nicholas)
February 18, 2013 Filing 83 Letter to The Honorable Christopher J. Burke from James M. Kron, Esquire on behalf of Defendant PACCAR Inc regarding response to Plaintiff's 021513 status letter - re #76 Order, #77 Letter, #73 Order, #64 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #82 Status Report, #78 Order, #74 Letter, #65 Opening Brief in Support,. (Kron, James)
February 15, 2013 Filing 82 STATUS REPORT Plaintiff's statement in response to Court Order regarding Paccar Motion to Dismiss by Harry A. Davis, Madonna S. Davis. (Hager, Kara)
February 15, 2013 Filing 81 NOTICE of Appearance by Eileen M. Ford on behalf of Superior Boiler Works Inc. (Ford, Eileen)
February 15, 2013 Filing 80 NOTICE of Appearance by Eileen M. Ford on behalf of Columbia Boiler Company (Ford, Eileen)
February 14, 2013 Filing 79 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (Notice of Removal), COUNTERCLAIM against All Defendants by Boeing Co.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Singewald, Christian)
February 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER : Plaintiffs shall submit a statement to the Court, by 2/15/13, indicating whether they have no opposition to Paccar's Motion and/or whether they intend to voluntarily dismiss Paccar from this case. (See Order for further details and deadlines) Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 2/12/2013. (dlk)
February 6, 2013 Filing 77 Letter to The Honorable Christopher J. Burke from James M. Kron, Esquire regarding Defendant PACCAR Inc status report - re #76 Order, #64 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #1 Notice of Removal, #74 Letter, #65 Opening Brief in Support,. (Kron, James)
February 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER: Within 14 days of the date of this Order, Plaintiff shall submit a statement to the Court, no more than 2 single-spaced pages, regarding the status of this matter, and any Defendant who elects to do so may also submit a statement, no more than 2 single-spaced pages. (See Order for further details). Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 02/05/2013. (mlc)
January 28, 2013 Filing 75 NOTICE of Service of Plaintiff's Answers to United Technologies Corporation's First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents by Harry A. Davis, Madonna S. Davis re #70 Notice of Service (Hager, Kara)
January 2, 2013 Filing 74 Letter to Judge Burke from James M. Kron, Esquire on behalf of Defendant PACCAR Inc regarding request that Motion To Dismiss be granted - re #71 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge, #73 Order, #64 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #1 Notice of Removal, #65 Opening Brief in Support,. (Kron, James)
December 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER that Plaintiffs shall file an Answering Brief within 14 days re: D.I. #64 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Paccar Inc, or the Court will render its decision on the papers submitted. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 12/17/2012. (dlk)
December 13, 2012 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Christopher J. Burke for Mediation. (dlk)
December 13, 2012 MOTIONS REFERRED: D.I. #64 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Motions referred to Judge Christopher J. Burke via Case Referral.(dlk)
December 13, 2012 Filing 72 NOTICE of Appearance of Agatha C. Mingos as Additional Counsel by Boeing Co. (Singewald, Christian)
December 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Christopher J. Burke. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 12/13/2012. Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(nmfn)
December 6, 2012 Filing 70 NOTICE OF SERVICE of First Set of Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents Directed to Plaintiff (served on November 20, 2012) by United Technologies Corporation.(Bradley, Paul)
December 4, 2012 Filing 69 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Superior Boiler Works Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Superior Holding, LLC for Superior Boiler Works Inc., Superior Boiler Works Inc., Superior Boiler Works Inc., Superior Boiler Works Inc., Superior Boiler Works Inc., Superior Boiler Works Inc., Superior Boiler Works Inc., Superior Boiler Works Inc., Superior Boiler Works Inc... (Mantzavinos, Megan) (Main Document 69 replaced on 12/4/2012) (lih).
December 4, 2012 CORRECTING ENTRY: The pdf of D.I. 69 has been replaced with a revised version of the document to include the judges initials. D.I. 70 has been removed from the docket pursuant to L.R. 5.4 (b) Service Without Filing. Consistent with Fed. R. Civ. P. 5(a), in cases where all parties are represented by counsel, all requests for discovery under Fed. R. Civ. P. 26, 30, 31, 33 through 36 and 45, and answers and responses thereto, and all required disclosures under Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a), shall be served upon other counsel or parties but shall not be filed with the Court. In lieu thereof, the party requesting discovery and the party serving responses thereto shall file with the Court a Notice of Service containing a certification that a particular form of discovery or response was served on other counsel or opposing parties, and the date and manner of service. (lih)
November 30, 2012 Filing 68 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Rheem Manufacturing Company identifying Other Affiliate PI. US Holding Inc. for Rheem Manufacturing Company.. (Parshall, Jonathan)
November 28, 2012 Filing 67 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), CROSSCLAIM against All Parties by Peerless Industries. (Skiles, Nicholas)
November 27, 2012 Filing 66 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), CROSSCLAIM against All Parties by Union Carbide Corporation. (Valocchi, Beth)
November 26, 2012 NOTICE: Per Magistrate Judge Fallon's Standing Order Regarding Courtesy Copies, which requires two (2) courtesy copies of all briefs and two (2) copies of any other document filed in support of any briefs (i.e., appendices, exhibits, declarations, affidavits etc.), please submit to the Clerk's Office a copy of D.I. # 65 and 66 bound separately. (lih)
November 16, 2012 Filing 65 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #64 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Paccar Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 12/3/2012. (Attachments: #1Exhibits A-D to Opening Brief)(Price, Somers) Modified on 11/26/2012 (lih).
November 16, 2012 Filing 64 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by Paccar Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(Price, Somers) Modified on 12/17/2012 (dlk).
November 15, 2012 Filing 63 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Paccar Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kron, James)
November 15, 2012 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #56 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Erik C. DiMarco. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 11/15/2012. (lih)
November 13, 2012 Filing 62 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Boeing Co.. (Singewald, Christian)
November 13, 2012 Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance by Christian J. Singewald on behalf of Boeing Co. (Singewald, Christian)
November 13, 2012 Filing 60 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by American Honda Motor Company Inc.. (Singewald, Christian)
November 13, 2012 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by Christian J. Singewald on behalf of American Honda Motor Company Inc. (Singewald, Christian)
November 13, 2012 Filing 58 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Ford Motor Company. (Singewald, Christian)
November 13, 2012 Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by Christian J. Singewald on behalf of Ford Motor Company (Singewald, Christian)
November 13, 2012 CORRECTING ENTRY: Text of D.I. 55 has been modified to identify corporate parent and other affiliate. (lih)
November 12, 2012 Filing 56 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Erik C. DiMarco - filed by General Dynamics Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Counsel)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Beste, Robert)
November 9, 2012 Filing 55 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Robert Bosch LLC. identifying corporate parent Robert Bosch North America Corporation and Robert Bosch Zweite Vermogensverwaltungsgesellschaft mbH and identifying other affiliate Robert Bosch GmbH.(Culley, David) Modified on 11/13/2012 (lih).
November 5, 2012 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul D. Sunshine on behalf of Ace Hardware Corporation (Sunshine, Paul)
November 2, 2012 Filing 53 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by John Deere Company. (Guerke, Kevin)
November 2, 2012 CORRECTING ENTRY: The text of D.I. number 49 and 52 has been modified. It is requested that counsel use the ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (NOTICE OF REMOVAL) event code when filing documents of this nature in the future. (lih)
November 1, 2012 Filing 52 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Service)(Daugherty, Sally) Modified on 11/2/2012 (lih).
November 1, 2012 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by Sally J. Daugherty on behalf of Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Daugherty, Sally)
November 1, 2012 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan L. Parshall on behalf of Rheem Manufacturing Company (Parshall, Jonathan)
November 1, 2012 Filing 49 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Lockheed Martin Corporation.(Della Porta, Armand) Modified on 11/2/2012 (lih).
November 1, 2012 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by Armand J. Della Porta, Jr on behalf of Lockheed Martin Corporation (Della Porta, Armand)
October 31, 2012 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin A. Guerke on behalf of John Deere Company (Guerke, Kevin)
October 23, 2012 Filing 46 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Columbia Boiler Company identifying Corporate Parent Vari Corporation for Columbia Boiler Company, Columbia Boiler Company, Columbia Boiler Company, Columbia Boiler Company, Columbia Boiler Company.. (Marlin, Jeffrey)
October 22, 2012 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Partick Daly on behalf of Carlisle Companies Incorporated (Daly, Daniel)
October 18, 2012 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Somers S. Price, Jr on behalf of Paccar Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Price, Somers)
October 17, 2012 Filing 43 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Kohler Co.. (Bocchino, Amaryah)
October 17, 2012 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason A. Cincilla, Amaryah K. Bocchino and Peter J. Faben on behalf of Kohler Co. (Cincilla, Jason) Modified on 10/18/2012 (lih).
October 16, 2012 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by David G. Culley on behalf of Robert Bosch LLC (Culley, David)
October 15, 2012 Filing 40 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), CROSSCLAIM against All Parties by Crane Co.. (Skiles, Nicholas)
October 15, 2012 Filing 39 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), CROSSCLAIM against All Parties by Eaton Corporation. (Skiles, Nicholas)
October 11, 2012 Filing 38 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Honeywell International Inc.. (Florax, Joelle)
October 11, 2012 Filing 37 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Honeywell International Inc.. (Florax, Joelle)
October 11, 2012 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Joelle Florax on behalf of Honeywell International Inc. (Florax, Joelle)
October 8, 2012 Filing 35 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by National Automotive Parts Association. (Bradley, Paul)
October 4, 2012 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald E. Reid on behalf of General Parts Inc. (Reid, Donald)
October 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Sherry R. Fallon. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 10/4/2012. (nmfn)
October 3, 2012 Filing 32 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Eaton Corporation identifying Other Affiliate Cutler Hammer Inc. for Eaton Corporation.. (Skiles, Nicholas)
October 3, 2012 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas E. Skiles on behalf of Eaton Corporation (Skiles, Nicholas)
October 3, 2012 Filing 30 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by CBS Corporation identifying Other Affiliate Viacom Inc. for CBS Corporation.. (Valocchi, Beth)
October 3, 2012 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Beth E. Valocchi on behalf of CBS Corporation (Valocchi, Beth)
October 3, 2012 Filing 28 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Union Carbide Corporation. (Valocchi, Beth)
October 3, 2012 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Beth E. Valocchi on behalf of Union Carbide Corporation (Valocchi, Beth)
October 3, 2012 Filing 26 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by General Electric Co. identifying Other Affiliate NBC Universal Inc. for General Electric Co... (Valocchi, Beth)
October 3, 2012 Filing 25 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Parties by General Electric Co..(Valocchi, Beth)
October 3, 2012 Filing 24 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Dana Companies LLC identifying Other Affiliate Dana Corporation for Dana Companies LLC.. (Valocchi, Beth)
October 3, 2012 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Beth E. Valocchi on behalf of Dana Companies LLC (Valocchi, Beth)
October 3, 2012 Case Assigned to Judge Sue L. Robinson. Please include the initials of the Judge (SLR) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
October 2, 2012 Filing 22 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Georgia Pacific LLC identifying Corporate Parent Georgia-Pacific Holdings, LLC for Georgia Pacific LLC.. (Faben, Peter)
October 2, 2012 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason A. Cincilla on behalf of Georgia Pacific LLC (Cincilla, Jason)
October 2, 2012 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Amaryah K. Bocchino on behalf of Georgia Pacific LLC (Bocchino, Amaryah)
October 2, 2012 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter John Faben on behalf of Georgia Pacific LLC (Faben, Peter)
October 2, 2012 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie Ann Fox on behalf of National Automotive Parts Association (Fox, Stephanie)
October 2, 2012 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie Ann Fox on behalf of Genuine Parts Company (Fox, Stephanie)
October 2, 2012 Filing 16 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Genuine Parts Company. (Bradley, Paul)
October 2, 2012 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul A. Bradley on behalf of National Automotive Parts Association (Bradley, Paul)
October 2, 2012 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul A. Bradley on behalf of Genuine Parts Company (Bradley, Paul)
September 28, 2012 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Trial Demanded by Superior Boiler Works Inc..(Mantzavinos, Megan)
September 28, 2012 Filing 12 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by General Dynamics Corporation. (Beste, Robert)
September 28, 2012 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Lucian Kasprzak on behalf of Superior Boiler Works Inc. (Kasprzak, Brian)
September 28, 2012 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Megan Trocki Mantzavinos on behalf of Superior Boiler Works Inc. (Mantzavinos, Megan)
September 26, 2012 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY TRIAL DEMANDED by Columbia Boiler Company.(Marlin, Jeffrey)
September 26, 2012 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Megan Trocki Mantzavinos on behalf of Columbia Boiler Company (Mantzavinos, Megan)
September 26, 2012 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey S. Marlin on behalf of Columbia Boiler Company (Marlin, Jeffrey)
September 25, 2012 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Karl Beste, III on behalf of General Dynamics Corporation (Beste, Robert)
September 25, 2012 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by R. Stokes Nolte on behalf of New Holland North America Inc. (Nolte, R.)
September 24, 2012 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by C. Scott Reese on behalf of Pneumo Abex Corporation (Reese, C.)
September 21, 2012 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by United Technologies Corporation. (dzb, )
September 21, 2012 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction (dzb, )
September 21, 2012 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL and copies of documents from Superior Court of the State of Delaware in and for New Castle County, Case Number N12C-07-228 ASB (Filing fee $350, receipt number 0311-1142980)- filed by United Technologies Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Certificate of Service)(dzb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis et al v. Ace Hardware Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BorgWarner Morse Tec Inc.
Represented By: Matthew P. Donelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia Pacific LLC
Represented By: Jason A. Cincilla
Represented By: Amaryah K. Bocchino
Represented By: Matthew Robert Pierce
Represented By: Peter John Faben
Represented By: Stephanie S. Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International Inc.
Represented By: Joelle Florax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Industrial Holdings Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Soco-West Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trane US Inc.
Represented By: Armand J. Della Porta, Jr.
Represented By: Jessica Lee Tyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Technologies Corporation
Represented By: Paul A. Bradley
Represented By: Donald Robert Kinsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whitney Automotive Group Inc.
Represented By: Nicholas E. Skiles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ace Hardware Corporation
Represented By: Paul D. Sunshine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advance Auto Parts Inc.
Represented By: Peter John Faben
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AGCO Corporation
Represented By: Armand J. Della Porta, Jr.
Represented By: Jessica Lee Tyler
Represented By: Sarah Anne Fruehauf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Honda Motor Company Inc.
Represented By: Christian J. Singewald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Autozone Inc.
Represented By: Peter S. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boeing Co.
Represented By: Amaryah K. Bocchino
Represented By: Bryan Patrick Smith
Represented By: Christian J. Singewald
Represented By: Jason A. Cincilla
Represented By: Jennifer Danella Oliva
Represented By: Melissa L. Troutner
Represented By: Nathan David Barillo
Represented By: William Bruce Larson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Borg-Warner Corporation
Represented By: Matthew P. Donelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlisle Companies Incorporated
Represented By: Daniel Patrick Daly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrier Corporation
Represented By: Armand J. Della Porta, Jr.
Represented By: Jessica Lee Tyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: Beth E. Valocchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CNH America LLC
Represented By: Brian Tome
Represented By: Matthew P. Donelson
Represented By: Peter S. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbia Boiler Company
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Marlin
Represented By: Eileen M. Ford
Represented By: Megan Trocki Mantzavinos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Represented By: Nicholas E. Skiles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cummins Inc.
Represented By: Barbara Anne Fruehauf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Companies LLC
Represented By: Beth E. Valocchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Domco Products LLP
Represented By: Willard F. Preston, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eaton Corporation
Represented By: Nicholas E. Skiles
Represented By: Joseph S. Naylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Christian J. Singewald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Dynamics Corporation
Represented By: Robert Karl Beste, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Co.
Represented By: Beth E. Valocchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia-Pacific Corporation
Represented By: Jason A. Cincilla
Represented By: Amaryah K. Bocchino
Represented By: Matthew Robert Pierce
Represented By: Peter John Faben
Represented By: Stephanie S. Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great Dane Limited Partnership
Represented By: Barbara Anne Fruehauf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.B. Fuller Company
Represented By: Joel M. Doner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AlliedSignal Inc.
Represented By: Joelle Florax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bendix Corporation
Represented By: Joelle Florax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carborundum Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Deere Company
Represented By: Kevin A. Guerke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John K. Bice Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Gypsum Company Inc.
Represented By: Armand J. Della Porta, Jr.
Represented By: Sarah Anne Fruehauf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kohler Co.
Represented By: Jason A. Cincilla
Represented By: Amaryah K. Bocchino
Represented By: Matthew Robert Pierce
Represented By: Peter John Faben
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lennox Industries Inc.
Represented By: Barbara Anne Fruehauf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lockheed Martin Corporation
Represented By: Armand J. Della Porta, Jr.
Represented By: Jessica Lee Tyler
Represented By: Sarah Anne Fruehauf
Represented By: Ana Marina McCann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Massey Ferguson Co.
Represented By: Barbara Anne Fruehauf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Sally J. Daugherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Automotive Parts Association
Represented By: Paul A. Bradley
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Holland North America Inc.
Represented By: R. Stokes Nolte
Represented By: Stephanie S. Levitsky
Represented By: Kate Harmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paccar Inc.
Represented By: Somers S. Price, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel F. Wolcott, Jr.
Represented By: James M. Kron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peerless Industries doing business as Peerless Heater Company
Represented By: Nicholas E. Skiles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pneumo Abex Corporation
Represented By: C. Scott Reese
Represented By: Christopher H. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rapid American Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rheem Manufacturing Company
Represented By: Jonathan L. Parshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Bosch LLC
Represented By: David G. Culley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenntag West Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Soco-Lynch Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superior Boiler Works Inc.
Represented By: Megan Trocki Mantzavinos
Represented By: Brian Lucian Kasprzak
Represented By: Eileen M. Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Standard Inc.
Represented By: Armand J. Della Porta, Jr.
Represented By: Jessica Lee Tyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Represented By: Beth E. Valocchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pratt & Whitney
Represented By: Paul A. Bradley
Represented By: Donald Robert Kinsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.C.C. Whitney & Co.
Represented By: Nicholas E. Skiles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: York International Corporation
Represented By: Peter S. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Parts Inc.
Represented By: Donald E. Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genuine Parts Company
Represented By: Paul A. Bradley
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Domco Products Texas Inc.
Represented By: Willard F. Preston, III
Represented By: Bernadette M. Plaza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harry A. Davis
Represented By: Diane M. Coffey
Represented By: Kara Anne Hager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Madonna S. Davis
Represented By: Diane M. Coffey
Represented By: Kara Anne Hager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Peerless Industries
Represented By: Nicholas E. Skiles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?