Halpert v. Zhang et al
Plaintiff: Philip Halpert
Defendant: Davin A. Mackenzie, AsiaInfo-Linkage Inc., Steve Zhang, Guoxiang Liu, Libin Sun, Jian Ding, Sean Shao, Thomas J. Manning, Suning Tian, Yungang Lu and Xiwei Huang
Case Number: 1:2012cv01339
Filed: October 17, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Sherry R Fallon
Referring Judge: Sue L Robinson
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 21, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2015 CASE CLOSED per D.I. Nos. #72 and #73 . (fms)
April 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #72 Report and Recommendations - denying as moot #37 Motion to Stay; granting #52 Motion to Dismiss ; denying #57 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 4/21/2015. (fms)
April 1, 2015 Filing 72 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS- DENYING as moot #37 MOTION to Stay, GRANTING #52 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Lack of Standing, DENYING #57 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Please note that when filing Objections pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b)(2), briefing consists solely of the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages) and the Response to the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages). No further briefing shall be permitted with respect to objections without leave of the Court. Objections to R&R due by 4/20/2015. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 4/1/2015. (lih)
July 24, 2014 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- pursuant to the request of counsel, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: the rule 16 scheduling teleconference set in this matter for 7/29/2014 is CANCELED. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 7/24/2014. (lih)
July 17, 2014 Filing 71 Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Benjamin J. Schladweiler regarding Scheduling Conference. (Schladweiler, Benjamin)
July 15, 2014 Filing 70 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Danielle Rowland Lindahl - filed by Philip Halpert. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Farnan, Brian)
July 15, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #70 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Danielle Rowland Lindahl. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 7/15/2014. (lih)
July 15, 2014 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Danielle M. Rowland Lindahl for Philip Halpert added for electronic noticing. (dmp, )
July 10, 2014 REQUEST: Per Magistrate Judge Fallon's Standing Order Regarding Courtesy Copies, which requires two (2) courtesy copies of all briefs and two (2) copies of any other document filed in support of any briefs (i.e., appendices, exhibits, declarations, affidavits etc.), it is requested that counsel submit to the Clerk's Office an additional copy of D.I. #37 , #38 , #52 , #53 , #54 , #55 , #56 , #57 , #58 , #59 , #60 , #61 , and #62 . (lih)
June 30, 2014 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b) CONFERENCE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: (1) A scheduling teleconference pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) will be held on Tuesday, July 29, 2014 at 9:30 a.m. Counsel for Plaintiff shall organize and initiate the teleconference to the Chambers of Sherry R. Fallon at 302-573-4557. (2) The parties are required to prepare for the teleconference by conferring on all matters under Rule 16 and D. Del. LR 16 and shall submit a proposed Scheduling Order to the Court no later than July 24, 2014. The Court's form scheduling order is posted at http://www.ded.uscourts.gov (see Chambers, Judge Fallon, Forms). If the parties have any suggestions or modifications to the standard Scheduling Order, they may be included in the proposed order for consideration by the Court. (3) If any disputed issue exists regarding the proposed Scheduling Order, it shall be noted therein, along with the parties proposed language on the issue for consideration by the Court. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 6/30/2014. (lih)
June 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Sherry R. Fallon. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 6/25/2014. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(nmfn)
June 25, 2014 The 7/31/2014 telephonic scheduling conference is cancelled per D.I. #69 . (nmfn)
June 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 68 Order Setting Telephonic Scheduling Conference: A Scheduling Conference is set for 7/31/2014 at 08:30 AM before Judge Sue L. Robinson. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 6/18/2014. (nmfn)
June 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER denying #34 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 6/6/2014. (nmfn)
June 6, 2014 Filing 66 MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 6/6/2014. (nmfn)
June 4, 2014 CORRECTING ENTRY: D.I. 64 has been removed from the docket as the correct version was filed at D.I. 65. (fms)
June 3, 2014 Filing 65 RESPONSE to Motion re #57 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint /DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY filed by Jian Ding, Xiwei Huang, Guoxiang Liu, Yungang Lu, Davin A. Mackenzie, Thomas J. Manning, Sean Shao, Libin Sun, Suning Tian, Steve Zhang. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Dent, Arthur)
May 27, 2014 Filing 63 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by Philip Halpert re #57 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Piergiovanni, Rosemary)
April 10, 2014 Filing 62 REPLY BRIEF re #57 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by Philip Halpert. (Farnan, Brian)
April 3, 2014 CORRECTING ENTRY: The docket texts of D.I. Nos. 59 and 60 have been amended to reflect that they are also filed by defendants Steve Zhang and Guoxiang Liu. (fms)
April 2, 2014 Filing 61 JOINDER by AsiaInfo-Linkage Inc., joining in #59 Response to Motion, #57 Motion for Leave to File Nominal Defendant's Joinder in Support of Individual Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Czerwonka, Scott)
April 2, 2014 Filing 60 DECLARATION re #59 Response to Motion, Declaration of Arthur L. Dent in support of Individual Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend by Jian Ding, Xiwei Huang, Yungang Lu, Davin A. Mackenzie, Thomas J. Manning, Sean Shao, Libin Sun, Suning Tian, Steve Zhang and Guoxiang Liu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Dent, Arthur) Modified on 4/3/2014 (fms).
April 2, 2014 Filing 59 RESPONSE to Motion re #57 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint /Individual Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend filed by Jian Ding, Xiwei Huang, Yungang Lu, Davin A. Mackenzie, Thomas J. Manning, Sean Shao, Libin Sun, Suning Tian, Steve Zhang and Guoxiang Liu. (Dent, Arthur) Modified on 4/3/2014 (fms).
March 19, 2014 Filing 58 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #57 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by Philip Halpert.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 4/7/2014. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Farnan, Brian)
March 19, 2014 Filing 57 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint - filed by Philip Halpert. (Farnan, Brian)
February 11, 2014 Filing 56 REPLY BRIEF re #52 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Lack of Standing filed by Jian Ding, Xiwei Huang, Guoxiang Liu, Yungang Lu, Davin A. Mackenzie, Thomas J. Manning, Sean Shao, Libin Sun, Suning Tian, Steve Zhang. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Schladweiler, Benjamin)
February 3, 2014 Filing 55 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #52 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Lack of Standing filed by Philip Halpert.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 2/13/2014. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Piergiovanni, Rosemary)
January 16, 2014 Filing 54 DECLARATION re #52 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Lack of Standing / Declaration of Benjamin J. Schladweiler in Support of the Individual Defendants' Post-Merger Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Standing by Jian Ding, Xiwei Huang, Guoxiang Liu, Yungang Lu, Davin A. Mackenzie, Thomas J. Manning, Sean Shao, Libin Sun, Suning Tian, Steve Zhang. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Schladweiler, Benjamin)
January 16, 2014 Filing 53 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #52 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Lack of Standing / Opening Brief in Support of the Individual Defendants' Post-Merger Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Standing filed by Jian Ding, Xiwei Huang, Guoxiang Liu, Yungang Lu, Davin A. Mackenzie, Thomas J. Manning, Sean Shao, Libin Sun, Suning Tian, Steve Zhang.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 2/3/2014. (Schladweiler, Benjamin)
January 16, 2014 Filing 52 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Lack of Standing - filed by Jian Ding, Xiwei Huang, Guoxiang Liu, Yungang Lu, Davin A. Mackenzie, Thomas J. Manning, Sean Shao, Libin Sun, Suning Tian, Steve Zhang. (Schladweiler, Benjamin)
December 26, 2013 Filing 51 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Objections to Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Production of Documents re #47 Notice of Service filed by Jian Ding, Xiwei Huang, Yungang Lu, Davin A. Mackenzie, Thomas J. Manning, Sean Shao, Libin Sun, Suning Tian.(Dent, Arthur)
December 19, 2013 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Stacey A. Harkey for Steve Zhang added for electronic noticing. (dmp, )
December 18, 2013 Filing 50 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Stacey A. Harkey - filed by Guoxiang Liu, Steve Zhang. (Schladweiler, Benjamin)
December 18, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #50 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Stacey A. Harkey filed by Guoxiang Liu, Steve Zhang. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 12/18/2013. (fms)
December 16, 2013 Filing 49 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Nominal Defendant AsiaInfo-Linkage, Inc.'s Objections To Plaintiff's Notice Of Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition by AsiaInfo-Linkage Inc..(Czerwonka, Scott)
December 4, 2013 Filing 48 NOTICE to Take Deposition of AsiaInfo-Linkage, Inc. on 12/19/2013 by Philip Halpert.(Farnan, Brian)
November 26, 2013 Filing 47 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for the Production of Documents by Philip Halpert.(Piergiovanni, Rosemary)
November 15, 2013 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sue L. Robinson - Oral Argument held on 11/15/2013. (Court Reporter V. Gunning.) (nmfn)
November 13, 2013 Filing 46 REPLY BRIEF re #34 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Philip Halpert. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Farnan, Brian)
November 11, 2013 Filing 45 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #34 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Jian Ding, Xiwei Huang, Yungang Lu, Davin A. Mackenzie, Thomas J. Manning, Sean Shao, Libin Sun, Suning Tian.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 11/21/2013. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Certificate of Service)(Dent, Arthur)
November 8, 2013 Filing 44 Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from John L. Reed regarding Supplementing the Company's pending Motion to Stay (Dkt. No. 37) - re #37 MOTION to Stay Nominal Defendant AsiaInfo-Linkage, Inc.'s Motion To Stay. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Part 1, #2 Exhibit A - Part 2)(Reed, John)
November 5, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #43 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Steven J. Purcell filed by Philip Halpert. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 11/5/2013. (fms)
November 4, 2013 Filing 43 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Steven J. Purcell - filed by Philip Halpert. (Farnan, Brian)
October 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER setting briefing schedule re #34 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings : (Answering Brief due 11/8/2013., Reply Brief due 11/13/2013.), ORDER, Setting Hearings( An Oral Argument is set for 11/15/2013 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2A before Judge Sue L. Robinson.). Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 10/28/2013. (nmfn)
October 25, 2013 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sue L. Robinson - Telephone Conference held on 10/25/2013. (Court Reporter V. Gunning.) (nmfn)
October 24, 2013 Filing 41 Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Brian E. Farnan regarding Proposed Scheduling Order. (Farnan, Brian)
October 24, 2013 Filing 40 PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING SCHEDULING on behalf of the Defendants and the Nominal Defendant by AsiaInfo-Linkage Inc., Jian Ding, Xiwei Huang, Guoxiang Liu, Yungang Lu, Davin A. Mackenzie, Thomas J. Manning, Sean Shao, Libin Sun, Suning Tian, Steve Zhang. (Attachments: #1 Enclosure Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson)(Schladweiler, Benjamin)
October 24, 2013 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Andrew Escobar for AsiaInfo-Linkage Inc. added for electronic noticing. (dmp, )
October 24, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #36 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Andrew Escobar filed by AsiaInfo-Linkage Inc. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 10/24/2013. (nmfn)
October 23, 2013 Filing 39 AFFIDAVIT of Scott B. Czerwonka re #37 MOTION to Stay Nominal Defendant AsiaInfo-Linkage, Inc.'s Motion To Stay, #38 Opening Brief in Support, Affidavit of Scott B. Czerwonka In Support Of Nominal Defendant AsiaInfo-Linkage,Inc.'s Motion To Stay filed by AsiaInfo-Linkage Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D Part 1, #5 Exhibit D Part 2, #6 Certificate of Service)(Czerwonka, Scott)
October 23, 2013 Filing 38 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #37 MOTION to Stay Nominal Defendant AsiaInfo-Linkage, Inc.'s Motion To Stay filed by AsiaInfo-Linkage Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 11/12/2013. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Czerwonka, Scott)
October 23, 2013 Filing 37 MOTION to Stay Nominal Defendant AsiaInfo-Linkage, Inc.'s Motion To Stay - filed by AsiaInfo-Linkage Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Czerwonka, Scott)
October 22, 2013 Filing 36 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Andrew Escobar - filed by AsiaInfo-Linkage Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Andrew Escobar, #2 Certificate of Service)(Czerwonka, Scott)
October 22, 2013 Filing 35 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #34 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Philip Halpert.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 11/8/2013. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Farnan, Brian)
October 22, 2013 Filing 34 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings - filed by Philip Halpert. (Farnan, Brian)
October 15, 2013 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Joseph S. Allerhand for Steve Zhang added for electronic noticing. (els)
October 9, 2013 Pro Hac Vice Attorney David J. Schwartz for Steve Zhang added for electronic noticing. (els)
October 8, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #33 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Joseph S. Allerhand, Paul A. Ferrillo and David J. Schwartz filed by Guoxiang Liu, Steve Zhang. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 10/8/2013. (nmfn)
October 1, 2013 Filing 33 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Joseph S. Allerhand, Paul A. Ferrillo and David J. Schwartz - filed by Guoxiang Liu, Steve Zhang. (Aronstam, Bradley)
October 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Order Setting Telephonic Scheduling Conference: A Scheduling Conference is set for 10/25/2013 at 08:30 AM before Judge Sue L. Robinson. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 9/30/2013. (nmfn)
October 1, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #29 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants Steve Zhang and Guoxiang Liu to answer Plaintiff's Complaint to September 26, 2013 filed by Guoxiang Liu, Steve Zhang. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 10/1/2013. (nmfn)
September 26, 2013 Filing 31 AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Jian Ding, Xiwei Huang, Yungang Lu, Davin A. Mackenzie, Thomas J. Manning, Sean Shao, Libin Sun, Suning Tian. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Redlined Answer, #2 Certificate of Service)(Dent, Arthur)
September 26, 2013 Filing 30 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand - Defendants Steve Zhang and Guoxiang Liu's Answer to Verified Shareholder Derivative Complaint by Guoxiang Liu, Steve Zhang.(Aronstam, Bradley)
September 24, 2013 Filing 29 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants Steve Zhang and Guoxiang Liu to answer Plaintiff's Complaint to September 26, 2013 - filed by Guoxiang Liu, Steve Zhang. (Aronstam, Bradley)
September 24, 2013 Filing 28 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL re Guoxiang Liu, Steve Zhang: Entry of appearance of attorney Bradley Ross Aronstam. Attorney Arthur L. Dent terminated. (Aronstam, Bradley)
September 19, 2013 Filing 27 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by AsiaInfo-Linkage Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Reed, John)
September 9, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #24 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to MOVE, ANSWER or otherwise RESPOND to Plaintiff's complaint to September 19, 2013 filed by AsiaInfo-Linkage Inc., #25 Stipulation, filed by Thomas J. Manning, Yungang Lu, Jian Ding, Suning Tian, Sean Shao, Libin Sun, Davin A. Mackenzie, Steve Zhang, Xiwei Huang, Guoxiang Liu, Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: AsiaInfo-Linkage Inc. answer due 9/19/2013; Guoxiang Liu answer due 9/19/2013; Steve Zhang answer due 9/19/2013. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 9/9/2013. (nmfn)
September 5, 2013 Filing 26 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with JURY DEMAND /Defendants Jian Ding, Xiwei Huang, Yungang Lu, Davin A. Mackenzie, Thomas J. Manning, Sean Shao, Libin Sun, and Suning Tian's Answer to Verified Shareholder Derivative Complaint by Jian Ding, Xiwei Huang, Guoxiang Liu, Yungang Lu, Davin A. Mackenzie, Thomas J. Manning, Sean Shao, Libin Sun, Suning Tian, Steve Zhang. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Dent, Arthur)
September 5, 2013 Filing 25 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Scheduling Order by Jian Ding, Xiwei Huang, Guoxiang Liu, Yungang Lu, Davin A. Mackenzie, Thomas J. Manning, Sean Shao, Libin Sun, Suning Tian, Steve Zhang. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Dent, Arthur)
September 4, 2013 Filing 24 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to MOVE, ANSWER or otherwise RESPOND to Plaintiff's complaint to September 19, 2013 - filed by AsiaInfo-Linkage Inc.. (Reed, John)
September 3, 2013 Filing 23 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL re AsiaInfo-Linkage Inc.: Entry of appearance of attorney John Leonard Reed. Attorney Arthur L. Dent and Potter Anderson & Corroon LLP terminated. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Reed, John)
August 26, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #22 Proposed Order, filed by AsiaInfo-Linkage Inc., Thomas J. Manning, Yungang Lu, Jian Ding, Suning Tian, Sean Shao, Libin Sun, Davin A. Mackenzie, Steve Zhang, Xiwei Huang, Guoxiang Liu, Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: AsiaInfo-Linkage Inc. answer due 9/5/2013; Jian Ding answer due 9/5/2013; Xiwei Huang answer due 9/5/2013; Guoxiang Liu answer due 9/5/2013; Yungang Lu answer due 9/5/2013; Davin A. Mackenzie answer due 9/5/2013; Thomas J. Manning answer due 9/5/2013; Sean Shao answer due 9/5/2013; Libin Sun answer due 9/5/2013; Suning Tian answer due 9/5/2013; Steve Zhang answer due 9/5/2013. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 8/26/2013. (nmfn)
August 21, 2013 Filing 22 PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation and Proposed Scheduling Order (for responsive pleadings regarding Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Verified Shareholder Derivative Complaint) re #21 Order on Motion to Dismiss by AsiaInfo-Linkage Inc., Jian Ding, Xiwei Huang, Guoxiang Liu, Yungang Lu, Davin A. Mackenzie, Thomas J. Manning, Sean Shao, Libin Sun, Suning Tian, Steve Zhang. (Dent, Arthur)
August 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER denying #10 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 8/7/2013. (nmfn)
August 8, 2013 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 8/7/2013. (nmfn)
July 18, 2013 Filing 19 NOTICE of of Subsequent Authority Pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.2(b) by AsiaInfo-Linkage Inc., Jian Ding, Xiwei Huang, Guoxiang Liu, Yungang Lu, Davin A. Mackenzie, Thomas J. Manning, Sean Shao, Libin Sun, Suning Tian, Steve Zhang re #17 Reply Brief, (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Exhibit A)(Dent, Arthur)
April 17, 2013 Filing 18 REQUEST for Oral Argument by AsiaInfo-Linkage Inc., Jian Ding, Xiwei Huang, Guoxiang Liu, Yungang Lu, Davin A. Mackenzie, Thomas J. Manning, Sean Shao, Libin Sun, Suning Tian, Steve Zhang re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Verified Shareholder Derivative Complaint. (Dent, Arthur)
April 17, 2013 Filing 17 REPLY BRIEF re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Verified Shareholder Derivative Complaint (with Certificate of Service) filed by AsiaInfo-Linkage Inc., Jian Ding, Xiwei Huang, Guoxiang Liu, Yungang Lu, Davin A. Mackenzie, Thomas J. Manning, Sean Shao, Libin Sun, Suning Tian, Steve Zhang. (Dent, Arthur)
April 12, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #16 Stipulation re page limits, filed by AsiaInfo-Linkage Inc., Thomas J. Manning, Yungang Lu, Jian Ding, Suning Tian, Sean Shao, Libin Sun, Davin A. Mackenzie, Steve Zhang, Xiwei Huang, Guoxiang Liu. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 4/12/2013. (fms)
April 11, 2013 Filing 16 STIPULATION and [PROPOSED] ORDER re: Reply Brief Page Limit re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Verified Shareholder Derivative Complaint by AsiaInfo-Linkage Inc., Jian Ding, Xiwei Huang, Guoxiang Liu, Yungang Lu, Davin A. Mackenzie, Thomas J. Manning, Sean Shao, Libin Sun, Suning Tian, Steve Zhang. (Dent, Arthur)
March 18, 2013 Filing 15 DECLARATION re #14 Answering Brief in Opposition, of Brian E. Farnan by Philip Halpert. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Farnan, Brian)
March 18, 2013 Filing 14 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Verified Shareholder Derivative Complaint filed by Philip Halpert.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 3/28/2013. (Farnan, Brian)
February 28, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #13 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Plaintiff to file Opposition to the Motion to Dismiss and for Defendants to file Reply Brief to March 18, 2013 and April 17, 2013. Set Briefing Schedule: re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Verified Shareholder Derivative Complaint. (Answering Brief due 3/18/2013., Reply Brief due 4/17/2013.) Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 2/28/2013. (nmfn)
February 27, 2013 Filing 13 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Plaintiff to file Opposition to the Motion to Dismiss and for Defendants to file Reply Brief to March 18, 2013 and April 17, 2013 - filed by Philip Halpert. (Farnan, Brian)
January 22, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Angela M. Liu filed by AsiaInfo-Linkage Inc., Thomas J. Manning, Yungang Lu, Jian Ding, Suning Tian, Sean Shao, Libin Sun, Davin A. Mackenzie, Steve Zhang, Xiwei Huang, Guoxiang Liu. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 1/22/2013. (fms)
January 18, 2013 Filing 12 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by AsiaInfo-Linkage Inc., Jian Ding, Xiwei Huang, Guoxiang Liu, Yungang Lu, Davin A. Mackenzie, Thomas J. Manning, Sean Shao, Libin Sun, Suning Tian, Steve Zhang identifying Corporate Parent AsiaInfo-Linkage, Inc. for AsiaInfo-Linkage Inc., Davin A. Mackenzie, Guoxiang Liu, Jian Ding, Libin Sun, Sean Shao, Steve Zhang, Suning Tian, Thomas J. Manning, Xiwei Huang, Yungang Lu.. (Dent, Arthur)
January 18, 2013 Filing 11 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Verified Shareholder Derivative Complaint filed by AsiaInfo-Linkage Inc., Jian Ding, Xiwei Huang, Guoxiang Liu, Yungang Lu, Davin A. Mackenzie, Thomas J. Manning, Sean Shao, Libin Sun, Suning Tian, Steve Zhang.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 2/4/2013. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B (1 of 2), #2 Exhibit B (2 of 2), #3 Exhibit C-F)(Dent, Arthur)
January 18, 2013 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Verified Shareholder Derivative Complaint - filed by AsiaInfo-Linkage Inc., Jian Ding, Xiwei Huang, Guoxiang Liu, Yungang Lu, Davin A. Mackenzie, Thomas J. Manning, Sean Shao, Libin Sun, Suning Tian, Steve Zhang. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss The Verified Shareholder Derivative Complaint)(Dent, Arthur)
January 18, 2013 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Joni S. Jacobsen,David Kistenbroker for AsiaInfo-Linkage Inc. added for electronic noticing. (dmp, )
January 15, 2013 Filing 9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Angela M. Liu - filed by AsiaInfo-Linkage Inc., Jian Ding, Xiwei Huang, Guoxiang Liu, Yungang Lu, Davin A. Mackenzie, Thomas J. Manning, Sean Shao, Libin Sun, Suning Tian, Steve Zhang. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order (Proposed) Order Granting Motion, #2 Certificate of Service)(Dent, Arthur)
November 16, 2012 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Joni S. Jacobsen filed by AsiaInfo-Linkage Inc., Thomas J. Manning, Yungang Lu, Jian Ding, Suning Tian, Sean Shao, Libin Sun, Davin A. Mackenzie, Steve Zhang, Xiwei Huang, Guoxiang Liu, #5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David H. Kistenbroker filed by AsiaInfo-Linkage Inc., Thomas J. Manning, Yungang Lu, Jian Ding, Suning Tian, Sean Shao, Libin Sun, Davin A. Mackenzie, Steve Zhang, Xiwei Huang, Guoxiang Liu. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 11/16/2012. (fms)
November 8, 2012 Filing 8 PROPOSED ORDER /Corrected Stipulation and [Proposed] Scheduling Order re #7 Proposed Order, (corrected dates) by AsiaInfo-Linkage Inc., Jian Ding, Xiwei Huang, Guoxiang Liu, Yungang Lu, Davin A. Mackenzie, Thomas J. Manning, Sean Shao, Libin Sun, Suning Tian, Steve Zhang. (Dent, Arthur)
November 8, 2012 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #8 CORRECTED Stipulation and Proposed Scheduling Order filed by AsiaInfo-Linkage Inc., Thomas J. Manning, Yungang Lu, Jian Ding, Suning Tian, Sean Shao, Libin Sun, Davin A. Mackenzie, Steve Zhang, Xiwei Huang, Guoxiang Liu. Defendants' motion to dismiss shall be due 1/18/2013. Plaintiffs' opposition to the motion to dismiss shall be due 3/4/2013. Defendants' reply in support of the motion to dismiss shall be due 4/3/2013. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 11/8/2012. (fms)
November 7, 2012 Filing 7 (THIS HAS BEEN CORRECTED - SEE D.I. #8 ) Joint PROPOSED ORDER /Stipulation and [Proposed] Scheduling Order by AsiaInfo-Linkage Inc., Jian Ding, Xiwei Huang, Guoxiang Liu, Yungang Lu, Davin A. Mackenzie, Thomas J. Manning, Sean Shao, Libin Sun, Suning Tian, Steve Zhang. (Dent, Arthur) Modified on 11/8/2012 (fms).
November 7, 2012 Filing 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Joni S. Jacobsen - filed by AsiaInfo-Linkage Inc., Jian Ding, Xiwei Huang, Guoxiang Liu, Yungang Lu, Davin A. Mackenzie, Thomas J. Manning, Sean Shao, Libin Sun, Suning Tian, Steve Zhang. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certification, #3 Certificate of Service)(Dent, Arthur)
November 7, 2012 Filing 5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David H. Kistenbroker - filed by AsiaInfo-Linkage Inc., Jian Ding, Xiwei Huang, Guoxiang Liu, Yungang Lu, Davin A. Mackenzie, Thomas J. Manning, Sean Shao, Libin Sun, Suning Tian, Steve Zhang. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certification, #3 Certificate of Service)(Dent, Arthur)
November 7, 2012 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Arthur L. Dent on behalf of All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Certficate of Service)(Dent, Arthur)
October 24, 2012 Case Assigned to Judge Sue L. Robinson. Please include the initials of the Judge (SLR) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
October 18, 2012 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Philip Halpert. AsiaInfo-Linkage Inc. served on 10/18/2012, answer due 11/8/2012. (Farnan, Brian)
October 18, 2012 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to AsiaInfo-Linkage Inc. on 10/18/2012. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (dmp, )
October 17, 2012 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction (dmp, )
October 17, 2012 Filing 1 VERIFIED SHAREHOLDER DERIVATIVE COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against AsiaInfo-Linkage Inc., Jian Ding, Xiwei Huang, Guoxiang Liu, Yungang Lu, Davin A. Mackenzie, Thomas J. Manning, Sean Shao, Libin Sun, Suning Tian, Steve Zhang - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 311-1158228.) - filed by Philip Halpert. (Attachments: #1 Verification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(dmp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Halpert v. Zhang et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davin A. Mackenzie
Represented By: Arthur L. Dent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AsiaInfo-Linkage Inc.
Represented By: David Kistenbroker
Represented By: Andrew Escobar
Represented By: John Leonard Reed
Represented By: Arthur L. Dent
Represented By: Joni S. Jacobsen
Represented By: Scott B. Czerwonka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Zhang
Represented By: David J. Schwartz
Represented By: Bradley Ross Aronstam
Represented By: Stacey A. Harkey
Represented By: Arthur L. Dent
Represented By: Joseph S. Allerhand
Represented By: Benjamin J. Schladweiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guoxiang Liu
Represented By: Bradley Ross Aronstam
Represented By: Arthur L. Dent
Represented By: Benjamin J. Schladweiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Libin Sun
Represented By: Arthur L. Dent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jian Ding
Represented By: Arthur L. Dent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Shao
Represented By: Arthur L. Dent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas J. Manning
Represented By: Arthur L. Dent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suning Tian
Represented By: Arthur L. Dent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yungang Lu
Represented By: Arthur L. Dent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xiwei Huang
Represented By: Arthur L. Dent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip Halpert
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Danielle M. Rowland Lindahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?