Princeton Digital Image Corporation v. Harmonix Music Systems Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Princeton Digital Image Corporation
Defendant: Harmonix Music Systems Inc. and Electronic Arts Inc.
Case Number: 1:2012cv01461
Filed: November 13, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Unassigned Judge
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 237 MEMORANDUM ORDER regarding Plaintiff's discovery disputes (D.I. 227 Joint MOTION for Teleconference to Resolve Discovery Dispute filed by Konami Digital Entertainment Inc., Electronic Arts Inc., Harmonix Music Systems Inc., Ubisoft Entertainment SA, Ubisoft Inc.). Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 2/22/2018. (mlc)
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 207 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Report and Recommendation (D.I. 183) in case 1:12-cv-01461-LPS-CJB and D.I. 123 in case 1:13-cv-00335-LPS-CJB) is ADOPTED; and Report and Recommendation (D.I. 193 in case 1:12-cv-01461-LPS-CJB and D.I. 129 in case 1:13-cv-00335-LPS-CJB) is ADOPTED in part and MODIFIED in part. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/13/17. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01461-LPS-CJB, 1:13-cv-00335-LPS-CJB (ntl)
December 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 206 MEMORANDUM ORDER re 200 REQUEST for Certification of Direct Appeal to the U.S. Court of Appeals filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation is DENIED. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/11/17. (ntl)
June 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 193 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION regarding claim construction. Please note that when filing Objections pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b)(2), briefing consists solely of the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages) and the Response to the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages). No further briefing shall be permitted with respect to objections without leave of the Court. Objections to R&R due by 7/3/2017. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 6/16/2017. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01461-LPS-CJB, 1:13-cv-00335-LPS-CJB(mlc)
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 191 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re 188 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION is ADOPTED; 101 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 03/30/17. (etg)
January 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 188 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending GRANTING-IN-PART and DENYING-IN-PART D.I. 101 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. Please note that when filing Objections pursuant to Fede ral Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b)(2), briefing consists solely of the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages) and the Response to the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages). No further briefing shall be permitted with respect to objections without leave of the Court. Objections to R&R due by 2/6/2017. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 1/19/2017. (mlc)
December 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 183 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION regarding claim construction. Please note that when filing Objections pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b)(2), briefing consists solely of the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages) and the Response to the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages). No further briefing shall be permitted with respect to objections without leave of the Court. Objections to R&R due by 12/19/2016. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 12/2/2016. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01461-LPS-CJB, 1:13-cv-00335-LPS-CJB(mlc)
August 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 176 MEMORANDUM ORDER re 139 Joint MOTION for Teleconference to Resolve Discovery Dispute filed by Konami Digital Entertainment Inc., Electronic Arts Inc., Harmonix Music Systems Inc. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 8/31/2016. (dlk)
January 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 78 MEMORANDUM ORDER DENYING (D.I. 75 in 1:12-cv-01461-LPS-CJB, 56 in 1:13-cv-00335-LPS-CJB) MOTION to Lift Stay filed by Princeton Digital Image Corporation. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 1/14/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01461-LPS-CJB, 1:13-cv-00335-LPS-CJB (aer)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Princeton Digital Image Corporation v. Harmonix Music Systems Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Princeton Digital Image Corporation
Represented By: Sean T. O'Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harmonix Music Systems Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electronic Arts Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?