Walkup et al v. Air & Liquid Systems Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Larry Walkup and Betty Walkup
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, BorgWarner Morse Tec Inc., Cameron International Corporation, CBS Corporation, Flowserve Corporation, Georgia Pacific LLC, Honeywell International Inc., National Service Industries, Inc., Buffalo Pumps Inc., Aurora Pump Company, Bell & Gossett Company, Borg-Warner Corporation, BW/IP International, Cooper Cameron Corporation, Cardox Corporation, Viacom Inc., Westinghouse Electric Corporation, Crane Company, Dana Companies LLC, Elliott Company, Fairchild Corporation, Rockwell International, FMC Corporation, Ford Motor Company, Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, Gardner Denver Inc., General Electric Company, Georgia-Pacific Corporation, Gorman Rupp Company, Goulds Pumps Inc., Grinnell Corporation, Allied Signal Inc., Bendix Corporation, Hopeman Brothers Inc., IMO Industries Inc., Ingersoll-Rand Company, Joy Technologies Inc., Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, North Brothers, Pneumo Abex Corporation, Rapid American Corporation, Simmons Rand Company, Jeffrey Company, Nash Engineering Company, Union Carbide Corporation, Weil-McLain, Western Auto Supply Company, Whitney Automotive Group Inc., Yarway Corporation, Thomas Scientific Inc., ITT Corporation and Flowserve US Inc., solely as successor to Rockwell Manufacturing Company
Cross Defendant: Kimberly-Clark Corporation, Louis Allis Company and Warren Pumps LLC
Case Number: 1:2012cv01635
Filed: December 3, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Sherry R Fallon
Referring Judge: Sue L Robinson
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2014 Filing 313 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT of Certified copy of USDC Docket Sheet, #312 Letter, and Certified copy of #311 Order by Prothonotary, Superior Court of Delaware on 10/29/2014. (fms)
October 23, 2014 Filing 312 Letter to Clerk, Superior Court of Delaware, New Castle County Courthouse from Deputy Clerk, U.S. District Court enclosing certified copy of the Order of Remand and certified copy of the U.S. District Court docket sheet - re #311 Order of Remand. (nmfn)
October 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 311 ORDER that this case is remanded to the Superior Court of Delaware in and for New Castle County re #310 . (CASE CLOSED). Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 10/22/2014. (nmfn)
October 21, 2014 Filing 310 STIPULATION to Remand to State Court by CBS Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order to remand, #2 Text of Proposed Order Stay deadlines)(Martyniak, Shawn)
September 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 309 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS #304 granting #208 Motion for Summary Judgment ; granting #238 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 9/8/2014. (nmfn)
September 8, 2014 Filing 308 MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 9/8/2014. (nmfn)
July 9, 2014 CORRECTING ENTRY: The text of D.I. numbers #306 and #307 has been modified to reflect that the documents are responses to the objection to the report and recommendation. It is requested that counsel use the event RESPONSE TO OBJECTIONS when filing a document of this nature in the future. (lih)
July 2, 2014 Exhibits 1-6 (docketed as D.I. Nos. 308-313) to D.I. 307 have been removed as separate entries and added as attachments to D.I. 307. (fms)
June 30, 2014 Filing 307 Response to Objections re #305 OBJECTION to #304 Report and Recommendations filed by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. Please note that when filing Objections pursuant filed by Nash Engineering Company. (Thompson, Eric) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/2/2014: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6) (fms). Modified on 7/9/2014 (lih).
June 30, 2014 Filing 306 Response to Objections re #305 OBJECTION to #304 Report and Recommendations filed by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. Please note that when filing Objections pursuant filed by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (Fruehauf, Barbara) Modified on 7/9/2014 (lih).
June 20, 2014 Filing 305 OBJECTION to #304 Report and Recommendations by Larry Walkup. (Coffey, Diane)
June 19, 2014 CORRECTING ENTRY: Docket clerk has deleted Objection to Report and Recommendation, formerly filed as D.I. 305, due to document being filed improperly. Counsel is advised to re-file the document using the OBJECTION TO REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION event code rather than the memorandum in opposition event code. (lih)
June 4, 2014 Filing 304 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS- GRANTING #208 MOTION for Summary Judgment, GRANTING #238 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Please note that when filing Objections pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b)(2), briefing consists solely of the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages) and the Response to the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages). No further briefing shall be permitted with respect to objections without leave of the Court. Objections to R&R due by 6/23/2014. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 6/4/2014. (lih)
May 21, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sherry R. Fallon - Oral Argument held on 5/21/2014 re #208 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #238 MOTION for Summary Judgment. (Court Reporter T. Carroll (Hawkins Reporting).) (lih)
May 19, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #303 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by BW/IP International. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 5/19/2014. (fms)
May 16, 2014 Filing 303 STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice by BW/IP International. (Doner, Joel)
May 16, 2014 Filing 302 Letter to Judge Hon. Sherry R. Fallon from Joelle Florax, Esq. regarding Withdrawl of Motion for Summary Judgment - re #211 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #212 Opening Brief in Support,. (Florax, Joelle)
May 14, 2014 Filing 301 Notice of Withdrawal re #210 Opening Brief, #209 MOTION for Summary Judgment - filed by CBS Corporation. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Valocchi, Beth) Modified on 5/14/2014 (lih).
May 14, 2014 CORRECTING ENTRY: The text of D.I. #301 has been modified to reflect that it is a Notice of Withdrawal rather than a motion to withdraw. Counsel is advised to use the NOTICE event code when filing a document of this nature in the future. (lih)
April 25, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #300 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by General Electric Company. General Electric Company terminated. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 4/25/2014. (fms)
April 23, 2014 Filing 300 STIPULATION of Dismissal by General Electric Company. (Martyniak, Shawn)
April 17, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #299 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Gorman Rupp Company. Gorman Rupp Company terminated. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 4/17/2014. (fms)
April 16, 2014 Filing 299 STIPULATION of Dismissalbetween Plaintiffs and Defendant The Gorman-Rupp Company by Gorman Rupp Company. (Malatesta, David) Modified on 4/21/2014 (lih).
April 15, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #298 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by ITT Corporation, ITT Corporation terminated. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 4/15/2014. (fms)
April 14, 2014 Filing 298 STIPULATION of Dismissal by ITT Corporation(ITT Corporation). (Phillips, John)
April 10, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #297 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Gardner Denver Inc. Gardner Denver Inc. terminated. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 4/10/2014. (fms)
April 9, 2014 Filing 297 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Gardner Denver Inc.. (Samis, Krista)
April 2, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #295 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by FMC Corporation. FMC Corporation terminated. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 4/2/2014. (fms)
April 2, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #296 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by BorgWarner Morse Tec Inc. BorgWarner Morse Tec Inc. terminated. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 4/2/2014. (fms)
April 1, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sherry R. Fallon - Telephone Conference held on 4/1/2014. (Court Reporter T. Carroll(Hakwins Reporting).) (lih)
April 1, 2014 Filing 296 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by BorgWarner Morse Tec Inc.. (Donelson, Matthew) Modified on 4/1/2014 (lih).
April 1, 2014 Filing 295 STIPULATION of Dismissal of FMC Corporation by FMC Corporation. (Daly, Daniel) Modified on 4/1/2014 (lih).
March 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 294 ORDER granting #277 Motion to Dismiss all claims and cross-claims against Georgia-Pacific, LLC. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 3/28/2014. (nmfn)
March 24, 2014 Filing 293 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon No opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment - filed by BW/IP International. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Doner, Joel)
March 24, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #291 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Ford Motor Company. Ford Motor Company terminated. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 3/24/2014. (fms)
March 24, 2014 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- Pursuant to the request of counsel for the plaintiffs, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: the oral argument set in this matter for 5/14/2014 is RESCHEDULED to 5/21/2014 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 6C before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 3/24/2014. (lih)
March 21, 2014 Filing 292 Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Diane M. Coffey, Esq. regarding requesting a brief rescheduling of the 5/14/2014 Oral Arguments on the pending Summary Judgment Motions - re Oral Order,, Set Hearings,. (Coffey, Diane)
March 21, 2014 Filing 291 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Ford Motor Company. (Singewald, Christian)
March 20, 2014 Filing 290 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Hopeman Brothers Inc.. (Nolte, R.)
March 19, 2014 Filing 289 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Failure to Oppose Summary Judgment - filed by BorgWarner Morse Tec Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Donelson, Matthew)
March 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 288 ORDER granting #259 Motion to Dismiss all claims and cross-claims against Defendant Aurora Pump Company. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 3/19/2014. (nmfn)
March 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 287 ORDER granting #252 Motion to Dismiss all claims and cross-claims against Defendant Warren Pumps, LLC. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 3/19/2014. (nmfn)
March 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 286 ORDER granting #250 Motion to Dismiss all claims and cross-claims against Defendant Joy Global Underground Mining LLC incorrectly named as Joy Technologies LLC. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 3/19/2014. (nmfn)
March 18, 2014 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: On 4/1/2014 at 10:30 AM the court will conduct a status telephone conference between plaintiffs and all defendants who have filed motions for summary judgment. Counsel for plaintiffs shall initiate the call to 302-573-4557. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 3/18/2014. (lih)
March 17, 2014 Filing 285 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon failure to oppose Motion for Summary Judgment - filed by Gorman Rupp Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Malatesta, David)
March 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 284 ORDER granting #248 Motion to Dismiss all claims and cross-claims against Defendant, Ingersoll Rand Company. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 3/14/2014. (nmfn)
March 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 283 ORDER granting #247 Motion to Dismiss all claims and cross-claims against Defendant, Thomas Scientific, Inc. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 3/14/2014. (nmfn)
March 12, 2014 Filing 282 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Plaintiff's failure to oppose summary judgment - filed by General Electric Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Martyniak, Shawn)
March 11, 2014 Filing 281 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon No Opposition to Motion For Summary Judgment - filed by ITT Corporation(ITT Corporation). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Phillips, John)
March 11, 2014 CORRECTING ENTRY: Pursuant to conversation with counsel, letter request (formerly D.I. 282) has been deleted and shall be re-filed as a motion. (lih)
March 10, 2014 Filing 280 REPLY BRIEF re #238 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit)(Fruehauf, Barbara)
March 7, 2014 Filing 279 REPLY BRIEF re #208 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Nash Engineering Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Thompson, Eric)
March 6, 2014 Filing 278 Letter to Judge Hon. Sherry R. Fallon from Willard F. Preston, Esq. regarding Withdrawl of Motion for Summary Judgment - re #207 Opening Brief in Support, #197 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Preston, Willard)
March 6, 2014 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: the Court will hear Oral Argument on the pending motions for summary judgment on 5/14/2014 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 6C before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. Counsel shall collectively have two hours to present argument. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 3/6/2014. (lih)
March 6, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #276 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Weil-McLain. Weil-McLain terminated. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 3/6/2014. (fms)
March 6, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #274 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Flowserve US Inc., solely as successor to Rockwell Manufacturing Company, #273 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Goulds Pumps Inc. Flowserve US Inc., solely as successor to Rockwell Manufacturing Company and Goulds Pumps Inc. terminated. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 3/6/2014. (nmfn)
March 5, 2014 Filing 277 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Stipulation of Dismissal - filed by Georgia Pacific LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Smiertka, Stephanie)
March 5, 2014 Filing 276 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant Weil-McLain by Weil-McLain. (Donelson, Matthew) Modified on 3/5/2014 (lih).
March 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 275 ORDER granting #195 Motion to Dismiss all claims and cross-claims against IMO Industries, Inc. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 3/5/2014. (nmfn)
March 4, 2014 Filing 274 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Flowserve US Inc., solely as successor to Rockwell Manufacturing Company. (Preston, Willard)
March 4, 2014 Filing 273 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant Goulds Pumps, Inc. by Goulds Pumps Inc.. (Goldman, Robert) Modified on 3/4/2014 (lih).
March 4, 2014 CORRECTING ENTRY: Docket clerk has deleted Answering Brief in opposition to #208 (formerly D.I. 265) due to document being filed improperly. Counsel is advised to refile the document using the ANSWERING BRIEF IN OPPOSITION event code rather than the notice event code. (lih)
March 4, 2014 CORRECTING ENTRY: Docket clerk has deleted notices of opposition, formerly D.I. numbers 267, 269 and 271. Counsel is advised that it is not necessary to file a notice of opposition prior to filing a response to a motion. (lih)
March 3, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #258 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Aurora Pump Company. Aurora Pump Company terminated. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 3/3/2014. (fms)
February 28, 2014 Filing 272 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #209 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Larry Walkup.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 3/10/2014. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Notice of Service)(Coffey, Diane)
February 28, 2014 Filing 270 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #211 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #212 Opening Brief in Support, filed by Larry Walkup.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 3/10/2014. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Notice of Service)(Coffey, Diane)
February 28, 2014 Filing 268 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #238 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #266 Memorandum in Opposition, #239 Opening Brief in Support, filed by Larry Walkup.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 3/10/2014. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Notice of Service)(Coffey, Diane)
February 28, 2014 Filing 266 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #208 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Larry Walkup.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 3/10/2014. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Notice of Service)(Coffey, Diane)
February 28, 2014 Filing 264 Letter to Judge Hon. Sherry R. Fallon from Shawn Martyniak, Esq. regarding Withdrawal of Motion for Summary Judgment - re #222 Opening Brief in Support, #221 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Martyniak, Shawn)
February 28, 2014 Filing 263 Letter to Judge Hon. Sherry R. Fallon from Shawn Martyniak, Esq. regarding Withdrawal of Motion for Summary Judgment - re #215 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #217 Opening Brief in Support,. (Martyniak, Shawn)
February 28, 2014 Filing 262 Letter to Judge Hon. Sherry R. Fallon from Shawn Martyniak, Esq. regarding Withdrawal of Motion for Summary Judgment - re #224 Opening Brief in Support, #223 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Martyniak, Shawn)
February 28, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #255 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Pneumo Abex Corporation. Pneumo Abex Corporation terminated. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 2/28/2014. (fms)
February 28, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #256 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Union Carbide Corporation. Union Carbide Corporation terminated. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 2/28/2014. (nmfn)
February 27, 2014 Filing 261 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26 Disclosures filed by Larry Walkup.(Coffey, Diane)
February 27, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #249 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Joy Technologies Inc. Joy Technologies Inc. terminated. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 2/27/2014. (fms)
February 27, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #251 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Warren Pumps LLC. Warren Pumps LLC terminated. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 2/27/2014. (fms)
February 27, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #254 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Cameron International Corporation. Cameron International Corporation terminated. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 2/27/2014. (fms)
February 27, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #253 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation. Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation terminated. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 2/27/2014. (fms)
February 26, 2014 Filing 260 Letter to Magistrate Judge Sherry R. Fallon from Donald R. Kinsley, Esq. regarding Requesting to Withdraw Aurora Pump Company's Motion for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Law and Points of Authorities in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment (D.I. Nos. 201 and 202) - re #201 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #202 MEMORANDUM in Support,. (Kinsley, Donald)
February 26, 2014 Filing 259 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon a Stipulation of Dismissal of All Claims and Crossclaims with Prejudice - filed by Aurora Pump Company. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Kinsley, Donald)
February 26, 2014 Filing 258 STIPULATION of Dismissal of All Claims and Crossclaims with Prejudice by Aurora Pump Company. (Kinsley, Donald) Modified on 2/27/2014 (lih).
February 25, 2014 Filing 257 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant ITT Corporation's Responses to Plaintiff's Request for Production, Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatoires and Responses to Plaintiff's Request for Admission filed by ITT Corporation(ITT Corporation).(Phillips, John)
February 25, 2014 Filing 256 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Union Carbide Corporation. (Martyniak, Shawn)
February 25, 2014 Filing 255 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Pneumo Abex Corporation. (Reese, C.)
February 25, 2014 Filing 254 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Cameron International Corporation. (Martyniak, Shawn)
February 25, 2014 Filing 253 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation. (Martyniak, Shawn)
February 25, 2014 Filing 252 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Stipulation of Dismissal - filed by Warren Pumps LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Tyler, Jessica)
February 25, 2014 Filing 251 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Warren Pumps LLC. (Tyler, Jessica)
February 25, 2014 Filing 250 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Stipulation of Dismissal - filed by Joy Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Tyler, Jessica)
February 25, 2014 Filing 249 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Joy Technologies Inc.. (Tyler, Jessica)
February 24, 2014 SECOND NOTICE: Per Magistrate Judge Fallon's Standing Order Regarding Courtesy Copies, which requires two (2) courtesy copies of all briefs and two (2) copies of any other document filed in support of any briefs (i.e., appendices, exhibits, declarations, affidavits etc.), please submit to the Clerk's Office two copies of D.I. #208 . (lih)
February 24, 2014 SECOND NOTICE: Per Magistrate Judge Fallon's Standing Order Regarding Courtesy Copies, which requires two (2) courtesy copies of all briefs and two (2) copies of any other document filed in support of any briefs (i.e., appendices, exhibits, declarations, affidavits etc.), please submit to the Clerk's Office two copies of D.I. #234 . (lih)
February 24, 2014 NOTICE: Per Magistrate Judge Fallon's Standing Order Regarding Courtesy Copies, which requires two (2) courtesy copies of all briefs and two (2) copies of any other document filed in support of any briefs (i.e., appendices, exhibits, declarations, affidavits etc.), please submit to the Clerk's Office two copies of D.I. #233 . (lih)
February 21, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #245 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 2/20/2014. (lih)
February 19, 2014 Filing 248 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Stipulation of Dismissal - filed by Ingersoll-Rand Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Letter to Honorable Magistrate Judge Fallon)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Tyler, Jessica)
February 19, 2014 Filing 247 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Stipulation of Dismissal - filed by Thomas Scientific Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Letter to Honorable Magistrate Judge Fallon)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Tyler, Jessica)
February 19, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #226 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Crane Company, Crane Company. Crane Company terminated. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 2/19/2014. (fms)
February 19, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #227 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Whitney Automotive Group Inc. Whitney Automotive Group Inc. terminated. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 2/19/2014. (fms)
February 19, 2014 NOTICE: Per Magistrate Judge Fallon's Standing Order Regarding Courtesy Copies, which requires two (2) courtesy copies of all briefs and two (2) copies of any other document filed in support of any briefs (i.e., appendices, exhibits, declarations, affidavits etc.), please submit to the Clerk's Office two copies of D.I. #197 , #201 , #206 , #207 , #208 , #211 , #212 , #231 , #232 , #233 , #234 and #240 . (lih)
February 19, 2014 NOTICE: Per Magistrate Judge Fallon's Standing Order Regarding Courtesy Copies, which requires two (2) courtesy copies of all briefs and two (2) copies of any other document filed in support of any briefs (i.e., appendices, exhibits, declarations, affidavits etc.), please submit to the Clerk's Office a copy of D.I. #233 and #234 . (lih)
February 18, 2014 Filing 246 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #240 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by FMC Corporation.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 3/7/2014. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B PART 1, #3 Exhibit B PART 2, #4 Exhibit B PART 3, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H)(Daly, Daniel)
February 18, 2014 NOTICE: Per Magistrate Judge Fallon's Standing Order Regarding Courtesy Copies, which requires two (2) courtesy copies of all briefs and two (2) copies of any other document filed in support of any briefs (i.e., appendices, exhibits, declarations, affidavits etc.), please submit to the Clerk's Office a copy of D.I. #211 and #212 . (lih)
February 18, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #194 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by IMO Industries Inc. IMO Industries Inc. terminated. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 2/18/2014. (fms)
February 18, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #192 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Ingersoll-Rand Company. Ingersoll-Rand Company terminated. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 2/18/2014. (fms)
February 18, 2014 CORRECTING ENTRY: The pdf's of D.I. numbers #239 and #240 have been replaced with revised versions of the documents. (lih)
February 18, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #193 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Thomas Scientific Inc. Thomas Scientific Inc. terminated. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 2/18/2014. (fms)
February 18, 2014 CORRECTING ENTRY: Docket clerk has deleted the exhibits attached to D.I. #240 . Documents will be re-filed with the opening brief. (lih)
February 17, 2014 Filing 245 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' Request for Production, First Set of Requests for Admissions and First Set of Interrogatories to 2/24/2014 - filed by ITT Corporation. (Bilson, David)
February 17, 2014 Filing 244 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #243 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by BW/IP International.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 3/6/2014. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)(Doner, Joel)
February 17, 2014 Filing 243 MOTION for Summary Judgment - filed by BW/IP International. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Motion Defendant BW/IP, Inc.'s Notice of Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Text of Proposed Order Defendant BW/IP, Inc.'s Proposed Order Granting Its Motion for Summary Judgment, #3 Certificate of Service)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Doner, Joel)
February 14, 2014 Filing 242 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #241 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Gorman Rupp Company.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 3/3/2014. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Certificate of Service)(Malatesta, David)
February 14, 2014 Filing 241 MOTION for Summary Judgment - filed by Gorman Rupp Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Malatesta, David)
February 14, 2014 Filing 240 MOTION for Summary Judgment - filed by FMC Corporation. (Attachments: #11 Text of Proposed Order)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Daly, Daniel) Modified on 2/18/2014 (lih). (Main Document 240 replaced on 2/18/2014) (lih).
February 14, 2014 Filing 239 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #238 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 3/3/2014. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Fruehauf, Barbara) (Main Document 239 replaced on 2/18/2014) (lih).
February 14, 2014 Filing 238 MOTION for Summary Judgment - filed by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Fruehauf, Barbara)
February 14, 2014 Filing 237 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #236 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Warren Pumps LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 3/3/2014. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A through D)(Tyler, Jessica)
February 14, 2014 Filing 236 MOTION for Summary Judgment - filed by Warren Pumps LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Tyler, Jessica)
February 14, 2014 Filing 235 Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Jessica L. Tyler, Esq. regarding Enclosing Courtesy Copies of Motion for Summary Judgment & Opening Brief on behalf of Joy Technologies LLC - re #214 Opening Brief in Support, #213 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Tyler, Jessica)
February 14, 2014 Filing 234 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #233 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Pneumo Abex Corporation.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 3/3/2014. (Reese, C.)
February 14, 2014 Filing 233 MOTION for Summary Judgment - filed by Pneumo Abex Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Summary Judgment)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Reese, C.)
February 14, 2014 Filing 232 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #231 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Ford Motor Company.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 3/3/2014. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit Exhibit M)(Singewald, Christian)
February 14, 2014 Filing 231 MOTION for Summary Judgment - filed by Ford Motor Company. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Singewald, Christian)
February 14, 2014 Filing 230 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #229 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Gardner Denver Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 3/3/2014. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Samis, Krista)
February 14, 2014 Filing 229 MOTION for Summary Judgment - filed by Gardner Denver Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Motion, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Notice of Service)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Samis, Krista)
February 14, 2014 Filing 228 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #225 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by ITT Corporation.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 3/3/2014. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Certificate of Service)(Phillips, John)
February 14, 2014 Filing 227 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Whitney Automotive Group Inc.. (Martyniak, Shawn)
February 14, 2014 Filing 226 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Crane Company. (Martyniak, Shawn)
February 14, 2014 Filing 225 MOTION for Summary Judgment - filed by ITT Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Phillips, John)
February 14, 2014 Filing 224 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #223 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Cameron International Corporation.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 3/3/2014. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Valocchi, Beth)
February 14, 2014 Filing 223 MOTION for Summary Judgment - filed by Cameron International Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Valocchi, Beth)
February 14, 2014 Filing 222 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #221 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Union Carbide Corporation.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 3/3/2014. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Valocchi, Beth)
February 14, 2014 Filing 221 MOTION for Summary Judgment - filed by Union Carbide Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Valocchi, Beth)
February 14, 2014 Filing 220 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #216 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Goulds Pumps Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 3/3/2014. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Certificate of Service)(Goldman, Robert) Modified on 2/14/2014 (lih).
February 14, 2014 Filing 219 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #218 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by General Electric Company.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 3/3/2014. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Valocchi, Beth)
February 14, 2014 Filing 218 MOTION for Summary Judgment - filed by General Electric Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Valocchi, Beth)
February 14, 2014 Filing 217 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #215 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 3/3/2014. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Valocchi, Beth)
February 14, 2014 Filing 216 MOTION for Summary Judgment - filed by Goulds Pumps Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Goldman, Robert) Modified on 2/14/2014 (lih).
February 14, 2014 Filing 215 MOTION for Summary Judgment - filed by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Valocchi, Beth)
February 14, 2014 Filing 214 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #213 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Joy Technologies Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 3/3/2014. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Tyler, Jessica)
February 14, 2014 Filing 213 MOTION for Summary Judgment - filed by Joy Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Tyler, Jessica)
February 14, 2014 Filing 212 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #211 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Honeywell International Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 3/3/2014. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Florax, Joelle)
February 14, 2014 Filing 211 MOTION for Summary Judgment - filed by Honeywell International Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Florax, Joelle)
February 14, 2014 Filing 210 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #209 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CBS Corporation.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 3/3/2014. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Valocchi, Beth)
February 14, 2014 Filing 209 MOTION for Summary Judgment - filed by CBS Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Valocchi, Beth)
February 14, 2014 Filing 208 MOTION for Summary Judgment - filed by Nash Engineering Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Text of Proposed Order)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Thompson, Eric)
February 14, 2014 Filing 207 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #197 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Flowserve US Inc., solely as successor to Rockwell Manufacturing Company.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 3/3/2014. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Preston, Willard)
February 14, 2014 Filing 206 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #204 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Weil-McLain.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 3/3/2014. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Donelson, Matthew)
February 14, 2014 Filing 204 MOTION for Summary Judgment - filed by Weil-McLain. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Donelson, Matthew)
February 14, 2014 Filing 203 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Georgia Pacific LLC. (Smiertka, Stephanie)
February 14, 2014 Filing 202 MEMORANDUM in Support re #201 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Aurora Pump Company.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 3/3/2014. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)(Bradley, Paul)
February 14, 2014 Filing 201 MOTION for Summary Judgment - filed by Aurora Pump Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Bradley, Paul)
February 14, 2014 Filing 199 MOTION for Summary Judgment - filed by BorgWarner Morse Tec Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Donelson, Matthew)
February 14, 2014 CORRECTING ENTRY: Docket clerk has deleted the opening briefs attached to D.I. numbers #197 , 198 and 200 due to documents being filed improperly. Counsel is advised to re-file the documents separately using the OPENING BRIEF event code rather than attaching the briefs to the motions. (lih)
February 14, 2014 CORRECTING ENTRY: Docket clerk has deleted the opening brief attached to D.I. 205 due to document being filed improperly. Counsel is advised to re-file the document separately using the OPENING BRIEF event code rather than attaching the brief to the motion. (lih)
February 14, 2014 CORRECTING ENTRY: Pursuant to conversation with counsel, Motions for Summary Judgment (formerly D.I. numbers 198, 200 and 205) have been deleted. (lih)
February 12, 2014 Filing 197 MOTION for Summary Judgment - filed by Flowserve US Inc., solely as successor to Rockwell Manufacturing Company. (Attachments: #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Preston, Willard) Modified on 2/14/2014 (lih).
February 12, 2014 Filing 196 Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson and The Honorable Magistrate Judge Sherry R. Fallon from Eileen M. Ford, Esquire regarding Motion for Dismissal and Stipulation of Dismissal - re #194 Stipulation of Dismissal, #195 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Stipulation Of Dismissal of IMO Industries, Inc.. (Ford, Eileen)
February 12, 2014 Filing 195 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Stipulation Of Dismissal of IMO Industries, Inc. - filed by IMO Industries Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Ford, Eileen)
February 12, 2014 Filing 194 STIPULATION of Dismissal by IMO Industries Inc.. (Ford, Eileen) Modified on 2/12/2014 (lih).
February 12, 2014 Filing 193 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Thomas Scientific Inc.. (Tyler, Jessica)
February 12, 2014 Filing 192 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Ingersoll Rand Company by Ingersoll-Rand Company. (Tyler, Jessica) Modified on 2/12/2014 (lih).
February 10, 2014 Filing 191 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Cardox Corporation. (Costello, Kelly)
February 10, 2014 Filing 190 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Objections and Response to Plaintiff's interrogatories, requests for admission, and requests for production re #178 Notice of Service, filed by Crane Company.(Martyniak, Shawn)
February 10, 2014 Filing 189 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Ford Motor Company's Answers to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories, Ford Motor Company's Responses to Plaintiff's First Requests for Production and Ford Motor Company's Responses to Plaintiff's First Requests for Admission filed by Ford Motor Company.(Singewald, Christian)
February 7, 2014 Filing 188 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Responses to Plaintiffs' Requests for Admission filed by FMC Corporation.(Daly, Daniel)
February 7, 2014 Filing 187 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Responses to Plaintiffs' Requests for Admission filed by FMC Corporation.(Daly, Daniel)
February 7, 2014 Filing 186 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's objections and responses to interrogatories, requests for production, and requests for admissions re #178 Notice of Service, filed by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation.(Valocchi, Beth)
February 7, 2014 Filing 185 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant The Gorman-Rupp Company's Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' Requests for Admission filed by Gorman Rupp Company.(Malatesta, David)
February 7, 2014 Filing 184 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Deadline for ITT to serve objections and responses to Plaintiffs' Request for Production, First Set of Requests for Admissions and First Set of Interrogatories to 02/17/2014 - filed by ITT Corporation. (Bilson, David)
February 7, 2014 Filing 183 Joint STIPULATION Choice of Law re #181 Letter by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation. (Martyniak, Shawn)
February 7, 2014 Filing 182 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Admission filed by Goulds Pumps Inc..(Goldman, Robert)
February 7, 2014 Filing 181 Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Shawn Martyniak, Esq. regarding Choice of Law. (Martyniak, Shawn)
February 7, 2014 Filing 180 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Production of Documents, and First Set of Requests for Admission with Verifications filed by Honeywell International Inc..(Florax, Joelle)
February 7, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #184 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME, #183 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 2/7/2014. (lih)
January 29, 2014 Filing 179 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Bankruptcy Claim Forms provided via email to Shawn Martyniak, Esquire on January 28, 2014 filed by Larry Walkup.(Coffey, Diane)
January 27, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sherry R. Fallon - Telephone Conference held on 1/27/2014. (Court Reporter T. Carroll (Hawkins Reporting).) (lih)
January 13, 2014 CORRECTING ENTRY: The text of D.I. #178 has been modified to correct the title of the document. (lih)
January 10, 2014 Filing 178 Notice of Service of Request for Production of Documents, Requests for Admissions and First Set of Interrogatories directed to Crane Co, Dana Companies,FairchildCorp,FMC,Ford,FosterWheeler,GormanRupp,Honeywell,ITTCorp. filed by Larry Walkup.(Coffey, Diane) Modified on 1/13/2014 (lih).
January 10, 2014 Filing 177 Joint STATUS REPORT by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation. (Martyniak, Shawn)
January 9, 2014 Filing 176 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL re All Plaintiffs : Entry of appearance of attorney Diane M. Coffey. Attorney Kara Hager terminated. (Coffey, Diane)
January 9, 2014 Filing 175 NOTICE of Appearance by David C. Malatesta, Jr on behalf of Gorman Rupp Company (Malatesta, David)
January 7, 2014 Filing 174 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant ITT Corporation's Amended Witness and Exhibit List filed by ITT Corporation.(Phillips, John)
November 26, 2013 Filing 173 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), CROSSCLAIM against All Parties by Whitney Automotive Group Inc.. (Skiles, Nicholas)
November 19, 2013 Filing 172 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(1) of Defendant Flowserve US Inc. solely as successor to Rockwell Manufacturing Company by Flowserve US Inc., solely as successor to Rockwell Manufacturing Company.(Preston, Willard)
November 15, 2013 Filing 171 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Witness & Exhibit List by Thomas Scientific Inc..(Tyler, Jessica)
November 7, 2013 Filing 170 NOTICE of Appearance by Bernadette M. Plaza on behalf of Flowserve US Inc., solely as successor to Rockwell Manufacturing Company (Plaza, Bernadette)
November 6, 2013 Filing 169 NOTICE of Appearance by Willard F. Preston, III on behalf of Flowserve US Inc., solely as successor to Rockwell Manufacturing Company (Preston, Willard)
November 6, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #168 Second STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to file witness and exhibit list to 11/15/2013 filed by Thomas Scientific Inc. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 11/6/13. (cak)
November 5, 2013 Filing 168 Second STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to file witness and exhibit list to 11/15/2013 - filed by Thomas Scientific Inc.. (Tyler, Jessica)
November 1, 2013 Filing 167 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie Elizabeth Smiertka on behalf of Georgia Pacific LLC (Smiertka, Stephanie)
November 1, 2013 Filing 166 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Individual Witness and Exhibit Lists by General Electric Company.(Valocchi, Beth)
November 1, 2013 Filing 165 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Individual Witness and Exhibit List by Cameron International Corporation.(Valocchi, Beth)
October 29, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #164 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Dana Companies. Dana Companies LLC terminated. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 10/29/2013. (fms)
October 24, 2013 Filing 164 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Dana Companies LLC. (Valocchi, Beth)
October 24, 2013 Filing 163 NOTICE of SERVICE OF INITIAL DISCLOSURES PURSUANT TO RULE 26(a)(1) by Ford Motor Company (Singewald, Christian)
October 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS #129 ; granting #115 Motion to Dismiss ; ; denying #35 Motion to Dismiss ; denying #36 Motion to Dismiss ; denying #37 Motion to Dismiss ; denying #41 Motion to Dismiss ; denying #59 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 10/24/2013. (nmfn)
October 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS ( #128 ) denying #13 Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 10/23/2013. (nmfn)
October 22, 2013 Filing 160 ANSWER to Complaint with TRIAL BY JURY OF TWELVE DEMANDED and, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Ford Motor Company.(Singewald, Christian)
October 15, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #157 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants Thomas Scientific Inc. to File Its Initial Witness and Exhibit List to November 1, 2013 filed by Thomas Scientific Inc., #156 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Defendants Witness and Exhibit Lists to November 1, 2013 filed by Cameron International Corporation. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 10/15/13. (cak)
October 11, 2013 Filing 159 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Georgia-Pacific LLC's Initial Witness and Exhibit List by Georgia Pacific LLC.(Larson, William)
October 11, 2013 Filing 158 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Initial Witness and Exhibit Lists on behalf of Defendant FMC Corporation on behalf of its former Turbo Pump Operation by FMC Corporation.(Daly, Daniel)
October 11, 2013 Filing 157 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants Thomas Scientific Inc. to File Its Initial Witness and Exhibit List to November 1, 2013 - filed by Thomas Scientific Inc.. (Tyler, Jessica)
October 11, 2013 Filing 156 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Defendants Witness and Exhibit Lists to November 1, 2013 - filed by Cameron International Corporation. (Valocchi, Beth)
October 11, 2013 Filing 155 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Gardner Denver, Inc.'s Initial Witness and Exhibit List by Gardner Denver Inc..(Samis, Krista)
October 11, 2013 Filing 154 NOTICE of SERVICE Initial Witness and Exhibit Lists by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation (Fruehauf, Barbara)
October 11, 2013 Filing 153 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Witness and Exhibit List by BW/IP International.(Doner, Joel)
October 11, 2013 Filing 152 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Goulds Pumps, Inc.'s Initial Witness and Exhibit List by Goulds Pumps Inc..(Goldman, Robert)
October 11, 2013 Filing 151 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Witness and Exhibit Lists by Nash Engineering Company.(Thompson, Eric)
October 11, 2013 Filing 150 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Initial Witness and Exhibit Lists on behalf of Defendant FMC Corporation on behalf of its former Peerless Pump, Chicago Pump and Northern Pump businesses by FMC Corporation.(Daly, Daniel)
October 11, 2013 Filing 149 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Flowserve US Inc.'s, solely as successor to Rockwell Manufacturing Company, Initial Witness and Exhibit List by Flowserve US Inc., solely as successor to Rockwell Manufacturing Company.(Preston, Willard)
October 11, 2013 Filing 148 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Witness and Exhibit Lists by Honeywell International Inc..(Florax, Joelle)
October 11, 2013 Filing 147 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Pneumo Abex, LLC's Witness and Exhibit Lists by Pneumo Abex Corporation.(Reese, C.)
October 11, 2013 Filing 146 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Witness and Exhibit List by Aurora Pump Company.(Bradley, Paul)
October 11, 2013 Filing 145 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Initial Witness and Exhibit List by Weil-McLain.(Donelson, Matthew)
October 11, 2013 Filing 144 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Initial Witness and Exhibit List by BorgWarner Morse Tec Inc..(Donelson, Matthew)
October 11, 2013 Filing 143 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant IMO Industries, Inc.'s Initial Witness & Exhibit Lists by IMO Industries Inc..(Ford, Eileen)
October 11, 2013 Filing 142 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Standard Witness and Exhibit Lists by Crane Company.(Martyniak, Shawn)
October 11, 2013 Filing 141 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Standard Witness and Exhibit Lists by Whitney Automotive Group Inc..(Skiles, Nicholas)
October 11, 2013 Filing 140 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Standard Witness and Exhibit Lists by Union Carbide Corporation.(Valocchi, Beth)
October 11, 2013 Filing 139 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Standard Witness and Exhibit Lists by CBS Corporation.(Valocchi, Beth)
October 11, 2013 Filing 138 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Standard Witness and Exhibit Lists by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation.(Valocchi, Beth)
October 11, 2013 Filing 137 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Witness and Exhibit List by Joy Technologies Inc..(Tyler, Jessica)
October 11, 2013 Filing 136 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Witness and Exhibit List by Ingersoll-Rand Company.(Tyler, Jessica)
October 11, 2013 Filing 135 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Witness and Exhibit List by Warren Pumps LLC.(Tyler, Jessica)
October 11, 2013 Filing 134 Witness List by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE)(Singewald, Christian)
October 11, 2013 Filing 133 Exhibit List by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE)(Singewald, Christian)
October 11, 2013 Filing 132 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant ITT Corporation's Initial Witness & Exhibit List by ITT Corporation.(Phillips, John)
October 1, 2013 Filing 131 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Georgia-Pacific LLCs Initial Disclosures by Georgia Pacific LLC.(Larson, William)
September 26, 2013 Filing 130 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Amended Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures by Aurora Pump Company.(Bradley, Paul)
September 26, 2013 Filing 129 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS - re #59 MOTION to Dismiss, #37 MOTION to Dismiss, #36 MOTION to Dismiss, #115 MOTION to Dismiss, #41 MOTION to Dismiss, #35 MOTION to Dismiss. Please note that when filing Objections pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b)(2), briefing consists solely of the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages) and the Response to the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages). No further briefing shall be permitted with respect to objections without leave of the Court. Objections to R&R due by 10/15/2013. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 9/26/13. (rwc) Modified on 9/27/2013 (lih).
September 26, 2013 Filing 128 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS - DENYING #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court- filed by Larry Walkup, Betty Walkup. Please note that when filing Objections pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b)(2), briefing consists solely of the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages) and the Response to the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages). No further briefing shall be permitted with respect to objections without leave of the Court. Objections to R&R due by 10/15/2013. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 9/26/13. (rwc) Modified on 9/27/2013 (lih).
September 23, 2013 Filing 127 Letter to Magistrate Judge Fallon from Peter J Faben - re #115 MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficiency of Service of Process.(Faben, Peter) Modified on 9/23/2013 (lih).
September 13, 2013 Filing 126 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), CROSSCLAIM against All Parties by Cardox Corporation.(Costello, Kelly) Modified on 9/16/2013 (lih).
September 11, 2013 Filing 125 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Flowserve US Inc., solely as successor to Rockwell Manufacturing Company identifying Corporate Parent Flowserve Corporation for Flowserve US Inc., solely as successor to Rockwell Manufacturing Company.. (Preston, Willard)
September 4, 2013 Filing 124 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Cardox Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Air Liquide America LP for Cardox Corporation.. (Costello, Kelly)
August 30, 2013 Filing 123 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly A. Costello on behalf of Cardox Corporation (Costello, Kelly)
August 30, 2013 CORRECTING ENTRY: Docket clerk has deleted Notice of Appearance (formerly D.I. 123) due to document having the wrong case caption. It is requested that counsel re-file the document with the correct case caption. (lih)
August 19, 2013 CORRECTING ENTRY: Docket clerk has deleted the Notice of Appearance of Andrew Silverman due to document being filed improperly. Counsel is advised that documents filed in matters that are unrelated must be captioned and electronically filed separately. (lih)
August 15, 2013 Filing 122 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance of Jeffrey S. Marlin, Esquire as counsel for IMO Industries, Inc. by IMO Industries Inc. (Ford, Eileen)
August 12, 2013 Filing 121 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Joint Witness and Exhibit List by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation.(Valocchi, Beth)
August 5, 2013 Filing 120 NOTICE of Appearance by William Bruce Larson, Jr on behalf of Georgia Pacific LLC (Larson, William)
August 2, 2013 Filing 119 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Executed Authorizations by Larry Walkup, Betty Walkup.(Hager, Kara)
August 2, 2013 Filing 118 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Answers to Requests for Admissions, Interrogatories and Requests for Production re #114 Notice of Service by Larry Walkup, Betty Walkup. Related document: #114 Notice of Service filed by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation.(Hager, Kara)
July 29, 2013 CORRECTING ENTRY: Docket clerk has deleted D.I. #118 pursuant to L.R. 5.4 (b) Service Without Filing. (lih)
July 11, 2013 CORRECTING ENTRY: The pdf of the main attached to D.I. 117 has been replaced with a revised copy of the document to include a caption page and Exhibit A. (lih)
July 10, 2013 Filing 117 EXHIBIT re #116 Opening Brief in Support by Western Auto Supply Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Faben, Peter) (Main Document 117 replaced on 7/11/2013) (lih).
July 10, 2013 Filing 116 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #115 MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficiency of Service of Process filed by Western Auto Supply Company.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 7/29/2013. (Faben, Peter)
July 10, 2013 Filing 115 MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficiency of Service of Process - filed by Western Auto Supply Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Faben, Peter)
July 3, 2013 Filing 114 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Interrogatories, Request for Production, and Request for admission upon Plaintiff's counsel by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation.(Valocchi, Beth)
June 27, 2013 Filing 113 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosure by Thomas Scientific Inc..(Tyler, Jessica)
June 20, 2013 Filing 112 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures by Honeywell International Inc..(Florax, Joelle)
June 6, 2013 Filing 111 NOTICE of Rule 26 Initial Disclosures by FMC Corporation (Daly, Daniel) Modified on 6/6/2013 (lih).
June 6, 2013 Filing 110 NOTICE of SERVICE of Rule 26(a) Initial Disclosures by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation (Fruehauf, Barbara)
June 5, 2013 Filing 109 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Federal Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures by BorgWarner Morse Tec Inc..(Donelson, Matthew)
June 5, 2013 Filing 108 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Federal Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures by Weil-McLain.(Donelson, Matthew)
June 5, 2013 Filing 107 NOTICE OF SERVICE of initial disclosures pursuant to Rule 26(a)(1) by Crane Company.(Skiles, Nicholas)
June 5, 2013 Filing 106 NOTICE OF SERVICE of initial disclosures pursuant to Rule 26(a)(1) by Whitney Automotive Group Inc..(Skiles, Nicholas)
June 5, 2013 Filing 105 NOTICE OF SERVICE of initial disclosures pursuant to Rule 26(a)(1) by Dana Companies LLC.(Valocchi, Beth)
June 5, 2013 Filing 104 NOTICE OF SERVICE of initial disclosures pursuant to Rule 26(a)(1) by Union Carbide Corporation.(Valocchi, Beth)
June 5, 2013 Filing 103 NOTICE OF SERVICE of initial disclosures pursuant to Rule 26(a)(1) by CBS Corporation.(Valocchi, Beth)
June 5, 2013 Filing 102 NOTICE OF SERVICE of initial disclosure statement pursuant to Rule 26(a)(1) by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation.(Valocchi, Beth)
June 4, 2013 Filing 101 NOTICE OF SERVICE of initial disclosures pursuant to Rule 26(a)(1) by General Electric Company.(Valocchi, Beth)
June 4, 2013 Filing 100 NOTICE OF SERVICE of initial disclosures pursuant to Rule 26(a)(1) by Cameron International Corporation.(Valocchi, Beth)
May 31, 2013 Filing 99 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant ITT Corporation's Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures by ITT Corporation.(Bilson, David)
May 31, 2013 Filing 98 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures by Aurora Pump Company.(Bradley, Paul)
May 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER- On or before 6/12/2013, Plaintiffs shall file with the Clerk of Court a request for entry of default in appearance for any Defendant who has been properly served but has not filed a responsive pleading. Set Deadlines: ( Notice of Compliance deadline set for 6/12/2013.) Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 5/30/2013. (lih)
May 30, 2013 Filing 96 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosure by IMO Industries Inc..(Marlin, Jeffrey)
May 30, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #90 Joint PROPOSED ORDER Scheduling Order. Set SCHEDULING ORDER deadlines: ( Joinder of Parties due by 8/5/2013., Amended Pleadings due by 8/5/2013., Discovery due by 2/7/2014., Status Report due by 1/10/2014., A Status Conference is set for 1/27/2014 at 09:00 AM before Judge Sherry R. Fallon, Dispositive Motions due by 2/14/2014.) Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 5/28/2013. (lih)
May 30, 2013 CORRECTING ENTRY: The pdf of D.I. 90 has been replaced with a revised version of the document to correct the caption. (lih)
May 29, 2013 Corporate Affiliates/Parents added per Disclosure Statement: identifying Corporate Parent No parent company for ITT Corporation. (Phillips, John)
May 28, 2013 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sherry R. Fallon - Telephone Conference held on 5/28/2013. (Court Reporter T. Carroll (Hawkins Reporting).) (lih)
May 28, 2013 Filing 95 NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Bilson on behalf of ITT Corporation (Bilson, David)
May 28, 2013 Filing 94 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures by Joy Technologies Inc..(Tyler, Jessica)
May 28, 2013 Filing 93 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Goulds Pumps, Inc.'s Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures by Goulds Pumps Inc..(Goldman, Robert)
May 28, 2013 CORRECTING ENTRY: Pursuant to conversation with counsel, Notice of Appearance (formerly D.I. 94) has been deleted. (lih)
May 28, 2013 CORRECTING ENTRY: Docket clerk has deleted D.I. 87 pursuant to L.R. 5.4 (b) Service Without Filing. Consistent with Fed. R. Civ. P. 5(a), in cases where all parties are represented by counsel, all requests for discovery under Fed. R. Civ. P. 26, 30, 31, 33 through 36 and 45, and answers and responses thereto, and all required disclosures under Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a), shall be served upon other counsel or parties but shall not be filed with the Court. In lieu thereof, the party requesting discovery and the party serving responses thereto shall file with the Court a Notice of Service containing a certification that a particular form of discovery or response was served on other counsel or opposing parties, and the date and manner of service. (lih)
May 24, 2013 Filing 92 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by BW/IP International identifying Corporate Parent Flowserve Corporation for BW/IP International.. (Doner, Joel)
May 24, 2013 Filing 91 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant BW/IP, Inc.'s Initial Federal Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures by BW/IP International.(Doner, Joel)
May 23, 2013 Filing 90 Joint PROPOSED ORDER Scheduling Order by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation. (Valocchi, Beth) Modified on 5/28/2013 (lih). (Main Document 90 replaced on 5/30/2013) (lih).
May 23, 2013 Filing 89 Letter to Honorable S. Fallon from Allison Texter, Esq. regarding Joint Proposed Scheduling Order - re Oral Order, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,. (Valocchi, Beth)
May 20, 2013 Filing 88 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Joy Technologies Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Joy Global Inc. for Joy Technologies Inc... (Tyler, Jessica)
May 17, 2013 Filing 86 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosure by Warren Pumps LLC.(Tyler, Jessica)
May 17, 2013 Filing 85 NOTICE of Appearance by Joel M. Doner on behalf of BW/IP International (Doner, Joel)
May 10, 2013 Filing 84 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosure by Ingersoll-Rand Company.(Tyler, Jessica)
May 9, 2013 Filing 83 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Thomas Scientific Inc.. (Tyler, Jessica)
May 9, 2013 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT NOTICE: In conjunction with the disclosure statement docketed in this action (See DI#83 ), corporate parents and other affiliates should be added to the case. The event code ADD CORPORATE AFFILIATES/PARENTS, found in the OTHER DOCUMENTS list, should be used to add this information. (rwc)
May 8, 2013 Filing 82 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), CROSSCLAIM against All Parties by Warren Pumps LLC.(Tyler, Jessica) Modified on 5/8/2013 (lih).
May 8, 2013 Filing 81 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), CROSSCLAIM against All Parties by Ingersoll-Rand Company.(Tyler, Jessica) Modified on 5/8/2013 (lih).
May 8, 2013 Filing 80 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Ingersoll-Rand Company identifying Corporate Parent Ingersoll-Rand, PLC for Ingersoll-Rand Company.. (Tyler, Jessica)
May 8, 2013 CORRECTING ENTRY: The text of D.I. numbers 81 and 82 has been modified to reflect that the document is a ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal). It is requested that counsel use the ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) event code when filing documents of this nature in the future. (lih)
May 3, 2013 Filing 79 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Warren Pumps LLC. (McCann, Ana)
May 3, 2013 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT NOTICE re #79 : In conjunction with the disclosure statement docketed in this action, corporate parents and other affiliates should be added to the case. The event code ADD CORPORATE AFFILIATES/PARENTS, found in the OTHER DOCUMENTS list, should be used to add this information. (lih)
April 29, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #78 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Kimberly-Clark Corporation. Kimberly-Clark Corporation terminated. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 4/29/2013. (fms)
April 26, 2013 Filing 78 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Kimberly-Clark Corporation. (Skiles, Nicholas)
April 25, 2013 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b) CONFERENCE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: (1) A scheduling teleconference pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) will be held on Tuesday, May 28, 2013, at 3:30 p.m. Counsel for Plaintiff shall organize and initiate the teleconference to the Chambers of Sherry R. Fallon at 302-573-4557. (2) The parties are required to prepare for the teleconference by conferring on all matters under Rule 16 and D. Del. LR 16 and shall submit a proposed Scheduling Order to the Court no later than May 23, 2013. The Court's form asbestos scheduling order is posted at http://www.ded.uscourts.gov (see Chambers, Judge Fallon, Forms). If the parties have any suggestions or modifications to the standard Scheduling Order, they may be included in the proposed order for consideration by the Court. (3) If any disputed issue exists regarding the proposed Scheduling Order, it shall be noted therein, along with the parties proposed language on the issue for consideration by the Court. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 4/25/2013. (lih)
April 12, 2013 Filing 77 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by FMC Corporation.(Daly, Daniel) Modified on 4/12/2013 (lih).
April 12, 2013 CORRECTING ENTRY: The text of D.I. 77 has been modified to reflect that the document is a ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal). It is requested that counsel use the ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) event code when filing documents of this nature in the future. (lih)
April 11, 2013 Filing 76 REPLY to Response to Motion re #59 MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficiency of Service of Process filed by Crane Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Skiles, Nicholas)
April 10, 2013 Filing 75 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by IMO Industries Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Colfax Corporation, Corporate Parent CLFX LLC, Corporate Parent IMO Holdings, Inc. for IMO Industries Inc..(Marlin, Jeffrey) Modified on 4/10/2013 (lih).
April 8, 2013 NOTICE: Per Magistrate Judge Fallon's Standing Order Regarding Courtesy Copies, which requires two (2) courtesy copies of all briefs and two (2) copies of any other document filed in support of any briefs (i.e., appendices, exhibits, declarations, affidavits etc.), please submit to the Clerk's Office two copies of D.I. # 74. (lih)
April 4, 2013 Filing 74 RESPONSE to Motion re #59 MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficiency of Service of Process by Crane Co. filed by Larry Walkup. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #9 Certifiicate of Service)(Hager, Kara) Modified on 4/4/2013 (lih).
April 3, 2013 Filing 73 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by IMO Industries Inc.. (Marlin, Jeffrey)
April 1, 2013 Filing 72 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey S. Marlin, Megan Trocki Mantzavinos and Eileen M. Ford on behalf of IMO Industries Inc. (Marlin, Jeffrey) Modified on 4/1/2013 (lih).
April 1, 2013 CORRECTING ENTRY: Notices of Appearances (formerly D.I. numbers 73 and 74) have been deleted as they were duplicate copies of D.I. 72. The text of D.I. 72 has been modified to reflect the entry of appearances Megan Trocki Mantzavinos and Eileen M. Ford. (lih)
March 28, 2013 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- Setting Briefing Schedule: re #59 MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficiency of Service of Process. On or before 4/4/2013, plaintiffs shall file their answering brief re #59 Motion to Dismiss. Should plaintiffs fail to file their answering brief, the Court shall rule on the papers submitted. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 3/28/2013. (lih)
March 27, 2013 Filing 71 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Ampco-Pittsburgh Corporation for Air & Liquid Systems Corporation.. (Fruehauf, Barbara)
March 21, 2013 Filing 70 REPLY to Response to Motion re #37 MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficiency of Service of Process filed by Dana Companies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Valocchi, Beth)
March 21, 2013 Filing 69 REPLY to Response to Motion re #36 MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficiency of Service of Process filed by Union Carbide Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Valocchi, Beth)
March 21, 2013 Filing 68 REPLY to Response to Motion re #35 MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficiency of Service of Process filed by CBS Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Valocchi, Beth)
March 20, 2013 Filing 67 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation.(Fruehauf, Barbara) Modified on 3/20/2013 (lih).
March 20, 2013 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: On or before 4/3/2013, reply briefs re #37 MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficiency of Service of Process filed by Dana Companies LLC, #36 MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficiency of Service of Process filed by Union Carbide Corporation, #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Larry Walkup, Betty Walkup, #35 MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficiency of Service of Process filed by CBS Corporation shall be filed. Should the parties fail to file their reply briefs, the Court shall rule on the papers submitted. Set briefing schedule (Reply Briefs due 4/3/2013.) Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 3/20/2013. (lih)
March 20, 2013 CORRECTING ENTRY: The text of D.I. 67 has been modified to reflect that the document is a ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal). It is requested that counsel use the ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) event code when filing documents of this nature in the future. (lih)
March 20, 2013 CORRECTING ENTRY: Docket clerk deleted D.I. 67 as it was a duplicate copy of D.I. 66. (lih)
March 19, 2013 Filing 66 STATUS REPORT by CBS, Union Carbide, Dana Companies, Crane Co, Whitney Automotive and by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation. (Valocchi, Beth) Modified on 3/20/2013 (lih).
March 19, 2013 Filing 65 STATUS REPORT by Larry Walkup, Betty Walkup. (Hager, Kara)
March 18, 2013 Filing 64 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Nash Engineering Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Thompson, Eric)
March 11, 2013 Filing 63 REPLY to Response to Motion re #41 MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficiency of Service of Process filed by Whitney Automotive Group Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Skiles, Nicholas)
March 11, 2013 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew P. Donelson on behalf of BorgWarner Morse Tec Inc. (Donelson, Matthew)
March 7, 2013 Filing 61 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Crane Company. (Skiles, Nicholas)
March 7, 2013 Filing 60 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Whitney Automotive Group Inc. identifying Other Affiliate U.S. Auto Parts Network, Inc. for Whitney Automotive Group Inc... (Skiles, Nicholas)
March 6, 2013 Filing 59 MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficiency of Service of Process - filed by Crane Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Certificate of Service, #8 Text of Proposed Order)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Skiles, Nicholas)
March 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER- Within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order: (1) Plaintiff(s) shall submit a statement to the Court that: (a) identifies those Defendants who have not yet been served with the Complaint; (b) identifies those Defendants who have been served with the Complaint but have not yet filed an Answer; (c) provides any reason why a Rule 16 conference should not occur within 30 days of the date of its submission; and (d) notes any other pending matters which require judicial action. Set deadline: ( Notice of Compliance deadline set for 3/19/2013.) (PLEASE REFER TO ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 3/5/2013. (lih)
March 4, 2013 Filing 57 RESPONSE to Motion re #41 MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficiency of Service of Process filed by Larry Walkup, Betty Walkup. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #9 Certificate of Service)(Hager, Kara) Modified on 3/5/2013 (lih).
March 1, 2013 Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by Armand J. Della Porta, Jr on behalf of Warren Pumps LLC (Della Porta, Armand)
March 1, 2013 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by Armand J. Della Porta, Jr on behalf of Ingersoll-Rand Company (Della Porta, Armand)
February 22, 2013 CORRECTING ENTRY: The text of D.I. 50 has been modified to correct the attorney appearance. (lih)
February 21, 2013 Filing 54 RESPONSE to Motion re #37 MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficiency of Service of Process filed by Larry Walkup, Betty Walkup. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #9 Certificate of Service)(Hager, Kara)
February 21, 2013 Filing 53 RESPONSE to Motion re #35 MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficiency of Service of Process filed by Larry Walkup, Betty Walkup. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #9 Certificate of Service)(Hager, Kara)
February 21, 2013 Filing 52 RESPONSE to Motion re #36 MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficiency of Service of Process filed by Larry Walkup, Betty Walkup. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #9 Certificate of Service)(Hager, Kara)
February 21, 2013 Filing 51 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), CROSSCLAIM for Indemnification, Contribution and or Set-Off against All Defendants by BW/IP International. (Donelson, Matthew) Modified on 2/22/2013 (lih).
February 21, 2013 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by Joel M. Doner on behalf of BW/IP International (Donelson, Matthew) Modified on 2/22/2013 (lih).
February 20, 2013 CORRECTING ENTRY: The text of D.I. numbers 44,47 and 49 has been modified to reflect that the document is a ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal). It is requested that counsel use the ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) event code when filing documents of this nature in the future. (lih)
February 19, 2013 Filing 49 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), CROSSCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Joy Technologies Inc..(Della Porta, Armand) Modified on 2/20/2013 (lih).
February 19, 2013 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by Armand J. Della Porta, Jr on behalf of Joy Technologies Inc. (Della Porta, Armand)
February 19, 2013 Filing 47 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), CROSSCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Thomas Scientific Inc..(Della Porta, Armand) Modified on 2/20/2013 (lih).
February 19, 2013 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by Armand J. Della Porta, Jr on behalf of Thomas Scientific Inc. (Della Porta, Armand)
February 19, 2013 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by Willard F. Preston, III on behalf of Flowserve Corporation (Preston, Willard)
February 19, 2013 Filing 44 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), CROSSCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Flowserve Corporation.(Preston, Willard) Modified on 2/20/2013 (lih).
February 18, 2013 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert S. Goldman on behalf of Goulds Pumps Inc. (Goldman, Robert)
February 14, 2013 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by John C. Phillips, Jr on behalf of ITT Corporation (Phillips, John)
February 12, 2013 NOTICE: Per Magistrate Judge Fallon's Standing Order Regarding Courtesy Copies, which requires two (2) courtesy copies of all briefs and two (2) copies of any other document filed in support of any briefs (i.e., appendices, exhibits, declarations, affidavits etc.), please submit to the Clerk's Office two copies of D.I. # 35,36,37 and 41. (lih)
February 8, 2013 Filing 41 MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficiency of Service of Process - filed by Whitney Automotive Group Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of service, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Skiles, Nicholas)
February 8, 2013 Filing 40 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Union Carbide Corporation identifying Other Affiliate The Dow Chemical Company for Union Carbide Corporation.. (Valocchi, Beth)
February 8, 2013 Filing 39 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Dana Companies LLC identifying Other Affiliate Dana Holding Corporation for Dana Companies LLC.. (Valocchi, Beth)
February 8, 2013 Filing 38 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by CBS Corporation. (Valocchi, Beth)
February 8, 2013 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT NOTICE re DI #38 : In conjunction with the disclosure statement docketed in this action, corporate parents and other affiliates should be added to the case. The event code ADD CORPORATE AFFILIATES/PARENTS, found in the OTHER DOCUMENTS list, should be used to add this information. (lih)
February 6, 2013 Filing 37 MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficiency of Service of Process - filed by Dana Companies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Text of Proposed Order, #8 Certificate of service)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Valocchi, Beth)
February 6, 2013 Filing 36 MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficiency of Service of Process - filed by Union Carbide Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Text of Proposed Order, #8 Certificate of service)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Valocchi, Beth)
February 6, 2013 Filing 35 MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficiency of Service of Process - filed by CBS Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Text of Proposed Order, #8 Certificate of service)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Valocchi, Beth)
February 6, 2013 Filing 34 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Larry Walkup on February 19, 2013 by FMC Corporation(Individually and as).(Daly, Daniel)
February 6, 2013 Filing 33 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Gardner Denver Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Samis, Krista) Modified on 2/6/2013 (lih).
February 6, 2013 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Krista Reale Samis on behalf of Gardner Denver Inc. (Samis, Krista)
February 6, 2013 CORRECTING ENTRY: The text of D.I. 33 has been modified to reflect that the document is a ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal). It is requested that counsel use the ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) event code when filing documents of this nature in the future. (lih)
January 28, 2013 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Scott Thompson on behalf of Nash Engineering Company (Thompson, Eric)
January 18, 2013 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Partick Daly on behalf of FMC Corporation (Daly, Daniel)
January 16, 2013 Filing 29 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Cameron International Corporation. (Valocchi, Beth)
January 15, 2013 Filing 28 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by General Electric Company identifying Other Affiliate NBC Universal Inc., Other Affiliate GE Capitol for General Electric Company.. (Valocchi, Beth)
January 15, 2013 Filing 27 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), CROSSCLAIM against All Parties by General Electric Company. (Valocchi, Beth)
January 15, 2013 Filing 26 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), CROSSCLAIM against All Parties by Cameron International Corporation. (Valocchi, Beth)
January 11, 2013 Filing 25 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Georgia Pacific LLC identifying Corporate Parent Georgia-Pacific Holdings LLC for Georgia Pacific LLC.. (Faben, Peter)
January 11, 2013 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason A. Cincilla on behalf of Georgia Pacific LLC (Cincilla, Jason)
January 11, 2013 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa L. Troutner on behalf of Georgia Pacific LLC (Troutner, Melissa)
January 11, 2013 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Amaryah K. Bocchino on behalf of Georgia Pacific LLC (Bocchino, Amaryah)
January 11, 2013 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter John Faben on behalf of Georgia Pacific LLC (Faben, Peter)
January 8, 2013 NOTICE: Per Magistrate Judge Fallon's Standing Order Regarding Courtesy Copies, which requires two (2) courtesy copies of all briefs and two (2) copies of any other document filed in support of any briefs (i.e., appendices, exhibits, declarations, affidavits etc.), please submit to the Clerk's Office a copy of D.I. # 13-16. (lih)
January 2, 2013 NOTICE: Per Magistrate Judge Fallon's Standing Order Regarding Courtesy Copies, which requires two (2) courtesy copies of all briefs and two (2) copies of any other document filed in support of any briefs (i.e., appendices, exhibits, declarations, affidavits etc.), please submit to the Clerk's Office a copy of D.I. # 13-16. (lih)
December 27, 2012 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 1/7/2013. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Text of Proposed Order)(Valocchi, Beth) Modified on 12/28/2012 (lih).
December 21, 2012 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Weil-McLain. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service to Answer to Complaint)(Donelson, Matthew)
December 21, 2012 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew P. Donelson on behalf of Weil-McLain (Donelson, Matthew)
December 19, 2012 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Barbara Anne Fruehauf on behalf of Air & Liquid Systems Corporation (Fruehauf, Barbara)
December 19, 2012 Filing 16 OBJECTIONS by Larry Walkup, Betty Walkup to Exhibits Submitted in Support of #1 Notice of Removal Filed by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation. (Hager, Kara) Modified on 12/19/2012 (lih).
December 19, 2012 Filing 15 DECLARATION of Kara Hager in Support of #13 MOTION to Remand by Larry Walkup, Betty Walkup. (Hager, Kara) Modified on 12/19/2012 (lih).
December 19, 2012 Filing 14 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Larry Walkup, Betty Walkup.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 1/7/2013. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibits H-K, #9 Exhibit Exhibits L-O, #10 Exhibit Exhibits P-R, #11 Exhibit Exhibit S part 1, #12 Exhibit Exhibit S part 2, #13 Exhibit Exhibit S part 3, #14 Exhibit Exhibit S part 4, #15 Exhibit Exhibit S part 5, #16 Exhibit Exhibit S part 6, #17 Exhibit Exhibit T)(Hager, Kara) Modified on 12/19/2012 (lih).
December 19, 2012 CORRECTING ENTRY: Per the re-filing of the exhibits present on the docket attached to D.I 14, attachments 2-21 have been removed from D.I. 13. (lih)
December 19, 2012 CORRECTING ENTRY: Docket clerk has deleted the following items from D.I. 13 (Motion to Remand): Memorandum in Support of Motion to Remand, Declaration of Kara Hager in support of Motion to Remand, and Objections to exhibits. It is requested that counsel re-file each item removed SEPARATELY using their respective event codes. Docket clerk has also deleted notice of motion attached to filing. Counsel is advised that a notice of motion is not required with the filing of any motion in District Court. (lih)
December 18, 2012 Filing 13 MOTION to Remand to State Court - filed by Larry Walkup, Betty Walkup. (Attachments: #22 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for Remand to State Court, #23 Exhibit Certificate of Service of Plaintiffs' Motion for Remand)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Hager, Kara) Modified on 12/19/2012 (lih). Modified on 12/19/2012 (lih).
December 18, 2012 Filing 12 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Honeywell International Inc.. (Florax, Joelle)
December 18, 2012 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Honeywell International Inc.. (Florax, Joelle)
December 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Sherry R. Fallon. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 12/13/2012. (nmfn)
December 12, 2012 Filing 9 Letter to Clerk from Beth Valocchi enclosing amended defendant's list to replace the original defendant's list attached to the civil cover sheet. (Attachments: #1 Defendant's list)(dzb, )
December 12, 2012 Case Assigned to Judge Sue L. Robinson. Please include the initials of the Judge (SLR) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
December 12, 2012 CORRECTING ENTRY: Defendant Utica Boilers Inc. removed and Defendant Thomas Scientific Inc. added per #9 Letter and State Court Amended Complaint (Exhibit A to Notice of Removal). (dzb, )
December 11, 2012 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Joelle Florax on behalf of Honeywell International Inc. (Florax, Joelle)
December 6, 2012 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), CROSSCLAIM against All Parties by Aurora Pump Company. (Bradley, Paul)
December 5, 2012 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald Robert Kinsley on behalf of Aurora Pump Company (Kinsley, Donald)
December 5, 2012 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Aurora Pump Company identifying Corporate Parent Pentair Inc. for Aurora Pump Company.. (Bradley, Paul)
December 5, 2012 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul A. Bradley on behalf of Aurora Pump Company (Bradley, Paul)
December 5, 2012 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by C. Scott Reese on behalf of Pneumo Abex Corporation (Reese, C.)
December 3, 2012 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction (dzb, )
December 3, 2012 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL and copies of documents from Superior Court of Delaware in and for New Castle County, Case Number N12C-06-3135 ASB (Filing fee $350, receipt number 0311-1183201)- filed by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Civil Cover Sheet, #14 Certificate of Service)(dzb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walkup et al v. Air & Liquid Systems Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation
Represented By: Barbara Anne Fruehauf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BorgWarner Morse Tec Inc.
Represented By: Matthew P. Donelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cameron International Corporation
Represented By: Beth E. Valocchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: Beth E. Valocchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowserve Corporation
Represented By: Willard F. Preston, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia Pacific LLC
Represented By: Jason A. Cincilla
Represented By: Melissa L. Troutner
Represented By: Peter John Faben
Represented By: Ryan William Browning
Represented By: Stephanie S. Riley
Represented By: William Bruce Larson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International Inc.
Represented By: Joelle Florax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Service Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buffalo Pumps Inc.
Represented By: Barbara Anne Fruehauf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Pump Company
Represented By: Paul A. Bradley
Represented By: Donald Robert Kinsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bell & Gossett Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Borg-Warner Corporation
Represented By: Matthew P. Donelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BW/IP International
Represented By: Matthew P. Donelson
Represented By: Joel M. Doner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cooper Cameron Corporation
Represented By: Beth E. Valocchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardox Corporation
Represented By: Kelly A. Costello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacom Inc.
Represented By: Beth E. Valocchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westinghouse Electric Corporation
Represented By: Beth E. Valocchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Company
Represented By: Nicholas E. Skiles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Companies LLC
Represented By: Beth E. Valocchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elliott Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fairchild Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockwell International
Represented By: Willard F. Preston, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMC Corporation
Represented By: Neal C. Glenn
Represented By: Daniel Patrick Daly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Christian J. Singewald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation
Represented By: Beth E. Valocchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gardner Denver Inc.
Represented By: Krista M. Reale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Beth E. Valocchi
Represented By: Shawn Edward Martyniak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia-Pacific Corporation
Represented By: Peter John Faben
Represented By: Ryan William Browning
Represented By: William Bruce Larson, Jr.
Represented By: Jason A. Cincilla
Represented By: Melissa L. Troutner
Represented By: Stephanie S. Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gorman Rupp Company
Represented By: Jon F. Winter
Represented By: David C. Malatesta, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps Inc.
Represented By: Robert S. Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grinnell Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied Signal Inc.
Represented By: Joelle Florax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bendix Corporation
Represented By: Joelle Florax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hopeman Brothers Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries Inc.
Represented By: Eileen M. Ford
Represented By: Megan Trocki Mantzavinos
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Marlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll-Rand Company
Represented By: Armand J. Della Porta, Jr.
Represented By: Jessica Lee Tyler
Represented By: Ana Marina McCann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joy Technologies Inc.
Represented By: Jessica Lee Tyler
Represented By: Armand J. Della Porta, Jr.
Represented By: Ana Marina McCann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Brothers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pneumo Abex Corporation
Represented By: C. Scott Reese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rapid American Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simmons Rand Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nash Engineering Company
Represented By: Paul D. Sunshine
Represented By: Eric Scott Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Represented By: Beth E. Valocchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weil-McLain
Represented By: Matthew P. Donelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Auto Supply Company
Represented By: Peter John Faben
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whitney Automotive Group Inc.
Represented By: Nicholas E. Skiles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yarway Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Scientific Inc.
Represented By: Ana Marina McCann
Represented By: Armand J. Della Porta, Jr.
Represented By: Jessica Lee Tyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT Corporation
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Represented By: David A. Bilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowserve US Inc., solely as successor to Rockwell Manufacturing Company
Represented By: Bernadette M. Plaza
Represented By: Willard F. Preston, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Walkup
Represented By: Diane M. Coffey
Represented By: Kara Anne Hager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty Walkup
Represented By: Diane M. Coffey
Represented By: Kara Anne Hager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Kimberly-Clark Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Louis Allis Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Warren Pumps LLC
Represented By: Jessica Lee Tyler
Represented By: Armand J. Della Porta, Jr.
Represented By: Ana Marina McCann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?