Damiani v. Delaware State Police Troop 2 et al
Plaintiff: Pablo A. Damiani
Defendant: Delaware State Police Troop 2, Detective Duffy, Detective Potts, Unknown State Police Detectives, Newark Emergency Center Inc., John Doe, Daniel Grassi, New Castle County Police Department, Boulden, Unknown NCC Police Officers, Wilmington Police Department, Morrissey and Officers Unknown Police Officers
Case Number: 1:2012cv01637
Filed: December 4, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: New Castle
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Andrews
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 324 MEMORANDUM re 314 MOTION to Alter Judgment and 321 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/30/2017. (nms)
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 310 MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Motion for an Extension of Time to appeal the October 4, 2017, Memorandum Opinion and Order (D.I. 309 ) is GRANTED. The time within Plaintiff may file a Notice of Appeal to the United States Court of Appeal for the Third Circuit is hereby extended to and included December 3, 2017. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/24/2017. (nms)
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 305 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/4/2017. (nms)
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 295 MEMORANDUM ORDER that Plaintiff's request for counsel is denied without prejudice to renew. (D.I. 289 ). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/19/2017. (nmg)
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 286 MEMORANDUM ORDER Denying without prejudice MOTION to Appoint Counsel (D.I. 274 ). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/1/2017. (nms)
February 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 267 MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding MOTION to Appoint Counsel (D.I. 229 ), Motion for Sanction of Dismissal (D.I. 232 ), and Motion to Strike (D.I. 237 ). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/16/2017. (nms)
November 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 114 MEMORANDUM OPINION - Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/5/14. (rwc)
July 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/12/13. (cla, )
April 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 2 COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/17/2013. (nms)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Damiani v. Delaware State Police Troop 2 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pablo A. Damiani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delaware State Police Troop 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Detective Duffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Detective Potts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown State Police Detectives
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newark Emergency Center Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Grassi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Castle County Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boulden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown NCC Police Officers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilmington Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morrissey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officers Unknown Police Officers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?