CallWave Communication LLC v. AT&T Mobility LLC et al. Featured Case
Plaintiff: CallWave Communications LLC
Defendant: AT&T Inc., Google LLC and AT&T Mobility LLC
Special Master: Yvonne Takvorian Saville, -SM-
Case Number: 1:2012cv01701
Filed: December 12, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 764 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT of 584 Multi Media Document. (rwc)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 763 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT of 451 Multi Media Document. (rwc)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 762 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT of 451 Multi Media Document. (rwc)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 761 Letter to Douglas Daniel Herrmann, Esq., from Clerk, dated 1/11/19, regarding return of Multi Media Document (D.I. 584 ). (rwc) Modified on 1/14/2019 (nms).
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 760 Letter to Jack B. Blumenfeld, Esq., from Clerk, dated 1/11/19, regarding return of Multi Media Document (D.I. 451 ). (rwc) Modified on 1/14/2019 (nms).
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 759 MANDATE of USCA as to #737 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit), filed by CallWave Communications LLC. USCA Decision: The Stay of proceedings is lifted. The motion is granted. The appeals are dismissed. Each side shall bear its own costs. (nms)
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 758 SO ORDERED Granting (757 in 12-cv-1701-RGA, 666 in 12-cv-1702-RGA, 708 in 12-cv-1704-RGA) Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/24/2017. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(nms)
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 757 STIPULATION of Dismissal by CallWave Communications LLC. (Herrmann, Douglas)
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 756 ORDER of USCA for the Federal Circuit. Decision of USCA: The Unopposed Motion to amend the caption is Granted. (nms)
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 755 ORDER Denying without prejudice Motion for Vacatur (751 in 12-cv-1701-RGA, 661 in 12-cv-1702-RGA, 325 in 12-cv-1788-RGA, 377 in 12-cv-1703-RGA, 702 in 12-cv-1704-RGA). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/10/2017. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 754 Amended Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Alphabet Inc., Corporate Parent XXVI Holdings Inc. for Google LLC, Google LLC, Google LLC filed by Google LLC. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 753 SO ORDERED Granting (752 in 12-cv-1701-RGA, 703 in 12-cv-1704-RGA, 662 in 12-cv-1702-RGA) Stipulation and Order to Reflect Name Change from Google Inc. to Google LLC and to Update Caption. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/4/2017. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(nms)
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 752 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order to Reflect Name Change from Google Inc. to Google LLC and to Update Caption by Google Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 751 MOTION for Vacatur - filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (Herrmann, Douglas) Modified on 9/14/2017 (nms).
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 750 ORDER of USCA as to #737 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit), filed by CallWave Communications LLC. Decision of USCA: (1) The motion to remand is granted to the limited extent (as explained). The court retains jurisdiction over the appeals at this time. (2) Proceedings in these appeals are stayed pending the district court's ruling on the motion to vacate. Within seven days from the date of the district court's ruling on the motion, the parties are directed to inform this court how they believe these appeals should proceed. (3) Google's motion for an extension of time is denied as moot (*see Order for further details). (nms)
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 749 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,771,970 B1; 7,907,933 B1; 7,555,110 B2; 7,397,910 B2; 7,822,188 B1; 8,351,591 B2. (Attachments: #1 Order)(nms)
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 748 SO ORDERED Granting (D.I. 658 in 12-cv-1702-RGA, D.I. 698 in 12-cv-1704-RGA, D.I. 747 in 12-cv-1701-RGA) Stipulation of Dismissal (***Civil Case Terminated). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/28/2017. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(nms)
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 747 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Google Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 746 ORAL ORDER: The request to CANCEL the hearing set for 7/31/2017 (D.I. 696 in 12-cv-1704-RGA, 745 in 12-cv-1701-RGA, and 656 in 12-cv-1702-RGA), is GRANTED. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/25/2017. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(nms)
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 745 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding July 31 afternoon hearing. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
July 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 744 Letter to Honorable Richard G. Andrews from James G. McMillan, III regarding hyperlinked copies of briefs. (McMillan, James) Modified on 7/18/2017 (nms).
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 743 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding hyperlinked briefs. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 742 ORAL ORDER: The parties are requested to promptly submit hyperlinked versions of the briefs associated with all pending motions. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/15/2017. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:13-cv-00711-RGA(nms)
May 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 741 ORAL ORDER: Oral argument on the pending Motions for Summary Judgment is now set for 7/31/2017, at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/26/2017. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(nms)
February 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 740 MANDATE of USCA as to #526 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit), filed by CallWave Communications LLC. USCA Decision: USDC Decision Affirmed. (Attachments: #1 Judgment)(nms)
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 739 NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA for the Federal Circuit re #737 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit), filed by CallWave Communications LLC. USCA Case Number 17-1630. (nms)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 738 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by CallWave Communications LLC for proceedings held on January 12, 2017 before Judge Richard G. Andrews, Transcript is Already on File. (McMillan, James)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 737 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Federal Circuit re #224 Memorandum Opinion, #227 Order, #635 Order, #736 Judgment, #634 Memorandum Opinion, and #734 Order. Appeal filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James) Modified on 2/13/2017 (nms).
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: Links to D.I. 224 and D.I. 227 have been added to D.I. 737 per counsel's request. (nms)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Notification regarding 737 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit) sent to Reporter Dibbs (nmg)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit re 737 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit). (nmg)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: Links to D.I. #224 and D.I. #227 have been added to D.I. #737 per counsel's request. (nms)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order APPEAL - Credit Card Payment of $505.00 received re #737 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit) filed by CallWave Communications LLC. ( Filing fee $505, receipt number 0311-2084093.) (McMillan, James)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit re #737 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit). (nmg)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order APPEAL - Credit Card Payment of $505.00 received re 737 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit) filed by CallWave Communications LLC. ( Filing fee $505, receipt number 0311-2084093.) (McMillan, James)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Notification regarding #737 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit) sent to Reporter Dibbs (nmg)
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 736 FINAL JUDGMENT regarding claims of infringement of claims 14-17 and 19 of U.S. Patent No. 6,771,970. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/12/2017. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
January 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 735 PROPOSED Final Judgment, by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James) Modified on 1/12/2017 (nms).
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 734 ORDER Granting Unopposed MOTION for Entry of Separate and Final Judgment Pursuant to Rule 54(b) (D.I. 731 in 12-cv-1701-RGA, D.I. 665 in 12-cv-1704-RGA, D.I. 310 in 12-cv-1788-RGA). Plaintiff is DIRECTED to submit within five days a jointly agreed order (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/6/2017. Associated Cases: 12-cv-1701-RGA, 12-cv-1704-RGA, 12-cv-1788-RGA(nms)
December 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 733 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Paul Saindon as co-counsel. Reason for request: No longer with firm. (Saindon, Paul)
December 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 732 ORAL ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (D.I. 649 in 12cv1701-RGA, D.I. 567 in 12cv1702-RGA, and D.I. 576 in 12cv1704-RGA) is DENIED. Plaintiff has not established that Defendant's Motion was untimely or that Defendant waived the defense. Even if the Motion were untimely, Plaintiff has not shown prejudice or bad faith to support the extreme sanction of striking this motion. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/16/2016. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(nms)
November 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 731 Unopposed MOTION for Entry of Separate and Final Judgment Pursuant to Rule 54(b) - filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James) Modified on 11/22/2016 (nms).
November 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 730 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from James G. McMillan, III regarding Callwave's request for oral argument on its Motion to Strike Google, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment That All Asserted Claims of the Patents-In-Suit Are Invalid Under 101. (McMillan, James)
November 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 729 SO ORDERED Granting (654 in 12-cv-1704-RGA, 645 in 12-cv-1702-RGA, 727 in 12-cv-1701-RGA) Stipulation and Order withdrawing motion. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/1/2016. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(nms)
October 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 728 Joint STATUS Letter, by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James) Modified on 11/1/2016 (nms).
October 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 727 STIPULATION to Withdraw Motion to Strike Googles Undisclosed Invalidity Defense Under 35 U.S.C. 102(g), by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James) Modified on 11/1/2016 (nms).
October 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 726 REPLY BRIEF re #649 MOTION to Strike Motion for Summary Judgment that All Asserted Claims of the Patents-In-Suit are Invalid Under Section 101 , filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits I-K, #2 Exhibit L, #3 Exhibits M-N)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/31/2016 (rwc). Modified on 10/31/2016 (nms). Modified on 10/31/2016 (nms).
October 31, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (643 in 12-cv-1702-RGA, 725 in 12-cv-1701-RGA, 397 in 13-cv-711-RGA, 652 in 12-cv-1704-RGA) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for joint status report to October 31, 2016, filed by CallWave Communications LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/31/2016. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:13-cv-00711-RGA(nms)
October 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 725 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for joint status report to October 31, 2016 - filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James)
October 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 724 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from James G. McMillan, III regarding Callwave's request for oral argument. (McMillan, James) Modified on 10/31/2016 (nms).
October 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 723 REDACTED VERSION of #706 Declaration, by Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul) Modified on 10/31/2016 (nms).
October 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 722 REDACTED VERSION of #704 Declaration, by Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul) Modified on 10/31/2016 (nms).
October 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 721 REDACTED VERSION of #703 Reply Brief, by Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul) Modified on 10/31/2016 (nms).
October 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 720 REDACTED VERSION of #701 Declaration, by Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul) Modified on 10/31/2016 (nms).
October 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 719 REDACTED VERSION of #699 Reply Brief, by Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul) Modified on 10/31/2016 (nms).
October 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 718 REDACTED VERSION of #698 Reply Brief, by Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul) Modified on 10/31/2016 (nms).
October 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 717 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Paul Saindon regarding Google's request for oral argument on pending motions. (Saindon, Paul) Modified on 10/31/2016 (nms).
October 27, 2016 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: The docket text and pdf for the Reply Brief filed on 10/21/2016, relating to the Testimony by CallWave's Experts Philip Green and David Lucantoni has been amended per counsel's request. The filing is now under seal. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA(nms)
October 27, 2016 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: The docket text and pdf for the Reply Brief filed on 10/21/2016, relating to the Testimony by CallWave's Experts Philip Green and David Lucantoni has been amended per counsel's request. The filing is now under seal. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA(nms)
October 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 716 REDACTED VERSION of #697 Declaration of Dat Nguyen, by Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-B)(Saindon, Paul) Modified on 10/27/2016 (nms).
October 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 715 REDACTED VERSION of #702 Reply Brief, by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James) Modified on 10/26/2016 (nms).
October 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 714 REDACTED VERSION of #695 Exhibits H, Part 2, I, Parts 1 and 2, and J-L, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit H, Part 2, #2 Exhibit I, Part 1, #3 Exhibit I, Part 2, #4 Exhibit J, #5 Exhibit K, #6 Exhibit L)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/25/2016 (nms).
October 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 713 REDACTED VERSION of #694 Exhibits G Parts 1 and 2 and H, Part 1, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit G, Part 1.1, #2 Exhibit G, Part 1.2, #3 Exhibit G, Part 2, #4 Exhibit H, Part 1)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/25/2016 (nms).
October 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 712 REDACTED VERSION of #693 Exhibit E Parts 1, 2, and 3, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E, Part 1, #2 Exhibit E, Part 2, #3 Exhibit E, Part 3)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/25/2016 (nms).
October 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 711 REDACTED VERSION of #692 Exhibit D, Part 2, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D, Part 2)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/25/2016 (nms).
October 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 710 REDACTED VERSION of #691 Exhibit D, Part 1, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D, Part 1)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/25/2016 (nms).
October 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 709 REDACTED VERSION of #690 Exhibit C Part 4, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C, Part 4)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/25/2016 (nms).
October 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 708 REDACTED VERSION of #689 Exhibits B, C Part 1, C Part 2 and C Part 3, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, Part 1, #2 Exhibit B, Part 2, #3 Exhibit C Part 1, #4 Exhibit C, Part 2, #5 Exhibit C, Part 3a, #6 Exhibit C (Part 3b))(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/25/2016 (nms).
October 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 707 NOTICE of Joinder in BroadSoft's Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity, by Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul) Modified on 10/25/2016 (nms).
October 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 706 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Nathaniel T. Browand re #705 Reply Brief, by Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-4)(Saindon, Paul) Modified on 10/24/2016 (nms).
October 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 705 REPLY BRIEF re #614 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of All Asserted Claims of the '110, '910, and '901 Patents Based on Prior Art filed by Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul)
October 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 704 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Dat Nguyen re #703 Reply Brief, by Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 11-17)(Saindon, Paul) Modified on 10/24/2016 (nms).
October 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 703 [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re #620 MOTION to Preclude Expert Testimony of Dr. David Lucantoni on Conception, Reduction to Practice, Diligence, Secondary Considerations of Non-Obviousness, and U.S. Patent No. 6,353,660 (Burger) filed by Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul)
October 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 702 [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re #626 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of W. Christopher Bakewell filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James)
October 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 701 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Nathaniel T. Browand re #700 Reply Brief, by Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-2)(Saindon, Paul) Modified on 10/24/2016 (nms).
October 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 700 REPLY BRIEF re #617 MOTION for Summary Judgment that All Asserted Claims of the Patents-In-Suit are Invalid Under Section 101 filed by Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul)
October 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 699 SEALED REPLY BRIEF re #623 MOTION to Preclude Testimony by CallWave's Experts Philip Green and David Lucantoni Concerning Alleged Damages, filed by Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul) Modified on 10/27/2016 (nms). (Main Document 699 replaced on 10/27/2016) (nms).
October 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 698 [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re #628 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Based on BroadWorks and Joinder in BroadSoft's Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity filed by Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul)
October 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 697 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Dat Nguyen re #696 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-B)(Saindon, Paul) Modified on 10/21/2016 (nms).
October 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 696 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #649 MOTION to Strike Motion for Summary Judgment that All Asserted Claims of the Patents-In-Suit are Invalid Under Section 101 filed by Google Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 10/31/2016. (Saindon, Paul)
October 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 695 [SEALED] EXHIBITS to #683 Opening Brief in Support, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit H Part 2, #2 Exhibit I Part 1, #3 Exhibit I Part 2, #4 Exhibit J, #5 Exhibit K, #6 Exhibit L)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/19/2016 (nms).
October 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 694 [SEALED] EXHIBITS to #683 Opening Brief in Support, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit G Part 1, #2 Exhibit G Part 2, #3 Exhibit H Part 1)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/19/2016 (nms).
October 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 693 [SEALED] EXHIBITS re #683 Opening Brief in Support, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E Part 1, #2 Exhibit E Part 2, #3 Exhibit E Part 3)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/19/2016 (nms).
October 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 692 [SEALED] EXHIBITS to #683 Opening Brief in Support, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D Part 2)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/19/2016 (nms).
October 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 691 [SEALED] EXHIBITS to #683 Opening Brief in Support, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D Part 1)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/19/2016 (nms).
October 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 690 [SEALED] EXHIBITS to #683 Opening Brief in Support, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C Part 4)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/19/2016 (nms).
October 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 689 [SEALED] EXHIBITS to #683 Opening Brief in Support, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit C Part 1, #3 Exhibit C Part 2, #4 Exhibit C Part 3a, #5 Exhibit C Part 3b)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/19/2016 (nms).
October 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 688 EXHIBITS to #683 Opening Brief in Support, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit F, #2 Exhibit M, #3 Exhibit N, #4 Exhibit O, #5 Exhibit P)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/19/2016 (nms).
October 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 687 EXHIBIT A, part 4 to #683 Opening Brief in Support, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Part 4)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/19/2016 (nms).
October 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 686 EXHIBIT A, part 3 to #683 Opening Brief in Support, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Part 3)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/19/2016 (nms).
October 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 685 EXHIBIT A, part 2 to #683 Opening Brief in Support, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Part 2)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/19/2016 (nms).
October 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 684 EXHIBIT A to #683 Opening Brief in Support, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Part 1)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/19/2016 (nms).
October 19, 2016 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: The exhibits filed at D.I. 684 and D.I. 685 have been removed from the docket. Counsel shall re-file the exhibits as a multi-volume filing. (nms)
October 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 683 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #682 MOTION to Strike Googles Undisclosed Invalidity Defense Under 35 U.S.C. 102(g), filed by CallWave Communications LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 11/4/2016. (McMillan, James) Modified on 10/19/2016 (nms).
October 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 682 MOTION to Strike Googles Undisclosed Invalidity Defense Under 35 U.S.C. 102(g) - filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James) Modified on 10/19/2016 (nms).
October 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 681 REDACTED VERSION of #661 Exhibits B, C, G & H to Declaration of Gregory S. Bishop, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits B, C, G and H)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/11/2016 (nms).
October 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 680 REDACTED VERSION of #659 Answering Brief in Opposition, by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James) Modified on 10/11/2016 (nms).
October 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 679 REDACTED VERSION of #662 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul) Modified on 10/11/2016 (nms).
October 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 678 REDACTED VERSION of #670 Exhibits A-B to Declaration of L. Andrew Tseng, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-B)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/11/2016 (nms).
October 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 677 REDACTED VERSION of #668 Answering Brief in Opposition, by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James) Modified on 10/11/2016 (nms).
October 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 676 REDACTED VERSION of #656 Exhibits B-F to Declaration of Megan E. L. Bigelow, by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James) Modified on 10/7/2016 (nms).
October 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 675 REDACTED VERSION of #654 Answering Brief in Opposition, by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James) Modified on 10/7/2016 (nms).
October 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 674 REDACTED VERSION of #667 Exhibits B, D, and I to Declaration of Suparna Datta, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits B-I)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/7/2016 (nms).
October 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 673 REDACTED VERSION of #664 Declaration of Dr. David Lucantoni, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix B)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/7/2016 (nms).
October 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 672 REDACTED VERSION of #663 Answering Brief in Opposition, by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James) Modified on 10/7/2016 (nms).
October 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 671 REDACTED VERSION of #651 Exhibits G and H in support of Memorandum in support, by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James) Modified on 10/7/2016 (nms).
October 5, 2016 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: The Notice of Appearance filed at D.I. 653 on 10/4/2016, has been removed from the docket. This filing was done in error. (nms)
October 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 670 [SEALED] EXHIBITS re #669 Declaration of L. Andrew Tseng, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-B, #2 Certificate of Service)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/5/2016 (nms).
October 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 669 DECLARATION of L. Andrew Tseng re #668 Answering Brief in Opposition, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/5/2016 (nms).
October 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 668 [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #628 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Based on BroadWorks and Joinder in BroadSoft's Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity filed by CallWave Communications LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 10/14/2016. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(McMillan, James)
October 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 667 [SEALED] EXHIBITS re #666 Declaration of Suparna Datta, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit D, #3 Exhibit I, #4 Certificate of Service)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/5/2016 (nms).
October 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 666 DECLARATION of Suparna Datta re #663 Answering Brief in Opposition, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit E, #4 Exhibit F, #5 Exhibit G, #6 Exhibit H)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/5/2016 (nms).
October 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 665 APPENDIX re #664 Declaration of Dr. David Lucantoni, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Appendicies C-H)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/5/2016 (nms). Modified on 10/5/2016 (nms).
October 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 664 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Dr. David Lucantoni re #663 Answering Brief in Opposition, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix B, #2 Certificate of Service)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/5/2016 (nms).
October 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 663 [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #614 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of All Asserted Claims of the '110, '910, and '901 Patents Based on Prior Art filed by CallWave Communications LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 10/14/2016. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(McMillan, James)
October 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 662 [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #626 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of W. Christopher Bakewell filed by Google Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 10/14/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-3, #2 Exhibits 4-8)(Saindon, Paul)
October 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 661 [SEALED] EXHIBITS re #660 Declaration of Gregory S. Bishop, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit G, #4 Exhibit H, #5 Certificate of Service)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/5/2016 (nms).
October 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 660 DECLARATION of Gregory S. Bishop re #659 Answering Brief in Opposition, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit D, #3 Exhibit E, #4 Exhibit F)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/5/2016 (nms).
October 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 659 [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #620 MOTION to Preclude Expert Testimony of Dr. David Lucantoni on Conception, Reduction to Practice, Diligence, Secondary Considerations of Non-Obviousness, and U.S. Patent No. 6,353,660 (Burger) filed by CallWave Communications LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 10/14/2016. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(McMillan, James)
October 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 658 DECLARATION of Gregory S. Bishop re #657 Answering Brief in Opposition, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/5/2016 (nms).
October 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 657 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #617 MOTION for Summary Judgment that All Asserted Claims of the Patents-In-Suit are Invalid Under Section 101 filed by CallWave Communications LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 10/14/2016. (McMillan, James)
October 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 656 [SEALED] EXHIBITS re #655 Declaration of Megan E.L. Bigelow, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit D, #4 Exhibit E, #5 Exhibit F, #6 Certificate of Service)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/5/2016 (nms).
October 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 655 DECLARATION of Megan E. L. Bigelow re #654 Answering Brief in Opposition, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit G)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/5/2016 (nms).
October 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 654 [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #623 MOTION to Preclude Testimony by CallWave's Experts Philip Green and David Lucantoni Concerning Alleged Damages filed by CallWave Communications LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 10/14/2016. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(McMillan, James)
October 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 652 7.1.1 Certification re #649 Motion to Strike, by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James) Modified on 10/4/2016 (nms).
October 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 651 [SEALED] EXHIBITS re #650 Opening Brief in Support, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit G, #2 Exhibit H, #3 Certificate of Service)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/4/2016 (nms).
October 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 650 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #649 MOTION to Strike Motion for Summary Judgment that All Asserted Claims of the Patents-In-Suit are Invalid Under Section 101, filed by CallWave Communications LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 10/20/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-F)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/4/2016 (nms).
October 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 649 MOTION to Strike Motion for Summary Judgment that All Asserted Claims of the Patents-In-Suit are Invalid Under Section 101 - filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James) Modified on 10/4/2016 (nms).
September 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 648 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Noah V. Malgeri as co-counsel. Reason for request: he is no longer with the firm.. (McMillan, James)
September 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 647 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Leah R. McCoy as co-counsel. Reason for request: no longer with the firm. (McMillan, James)
September 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 646 ORDER re (645 in 12-cv-1701-RGA, 306 in 12-cv-1788-RGA, 572 in 12-cv-1704-RGA) Stipulation and Order adjourning the scheduling order deadlines relating to the '970 Patent. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/22/2016. Associated Cases: 12-cv-1701-RGA, 12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
September 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 645 STIPULATION to Adjourn Remaining Deadlines set forth in the Amended Scheduling Order of all Asserted Claims of the '970 Patent by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James)
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 644 REDACTED VERSION of #631 Exhibits, by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James) Modified on 9/19/2016 (nms).
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 643 REDACTED VERSION of #627 Opening Brief in Support, by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James) Modified on 9/19/2016 (nms).
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 642 REDACTED VERSION of #628 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Based on BroadWorks and Joinder in BroadSoft's Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity, by Google Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 9/19/2016 (nms).
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 641 REDACTED VERSION of #625 Declaration, by Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-7)(Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 9/19/2016 (nms).
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 640 REDACTED VERSION of #624 Opening Brief in Support, by Google Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 9/19/2016 (nms).
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 639 REDACTED VERSION of #622 Declaration, by Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-10)(Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 9/19/2016 (nms).
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 638 REDACTED VERSION of #621 Opening Brief in Support, by Google Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 9/19/2016 (nms).
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 637 REDACTED VERSION of #616 Declaration, by Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibits 4-16)(Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 9/19/2016 (nms).
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 636 REDACTED VERSION of #615 Opening Brief in Support, by Google Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 9/19/2016 (nms).
September 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 635 ORDER Granting Renewed Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings that All Asserted Claims of the '970 Patent are Invalid under Section 101 (D.I. 439 in 12-1701, D.I. 419 in 12-cv-1704-RGA, D.I. 249 in 12-cv-1788-RGA). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/15/2016. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
September 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 634 MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding Renewed Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings that All Asserted Claims of the '970 Patent are Invalid under Section 101. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/15/2016. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
September 15, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (633 in 12-cv-1701-RGA, 561 in 12-cv-1704-RGA, 319 in 13-cv-711-RGA, 555 in 12-cv-1702-RGA) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Responses to Motions for Summary Judgment, Daubert Motions, and Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and Reply Briefs to October 4, 2016, and October 21, 2016, filed by CallWave Communications LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/15/2016. Associated Cases: 12-cv-1701-RGA, 12-cv-1702-RGA, 12-cv-1704-RGA, 13-cv-711-RGA(nms)
September 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 633 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Responses to Motions for Summary Judgment, Daubert Motions, and Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and Reply Briefs to October 4, 2016 and October 21, 2016 - filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James)
September 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 632 NOTICE Regarding Joinder in Broadsoft's Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity by Google Inc. (see Motion and Joinder filed at D.I. #628 ). (Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 9/14/2016 (nms).
September 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 631 [SEALED] EXHIBITS to #627 Opening Brief in Support, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit D Part 1, #4 Exhibit D Part 2, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(McMillan, James) Modified on 9/12/2016 (nms).
September 12, 2016 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: The pdf for D.I. #615 has been replaced with a corrected version per counsel's request. (nms) Modified on 9/12/2016 (nms).
September 12, 2016 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: The pdf for D.I. 615 has been replaced with a corrected version per counsel's request. (nms) Modified on 9/12/2016 (nms).
September 12, 2016 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: The pdf for D.I. 618 has been replaced per counsel's request. The table of contents has been corrected. (nms)
September 12, 2016 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: The Notice of Multi-Media filing (D.I. 629) has been removed from the docket. Counsel has been advised as to how to proceed with the filing, and shall do so accordingly. (nms)
September 12, 2016 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: D.I. 631 and 631 have been removed from the docket. Counsel shall re-file the exhibits used at these entries all together at one docket item entry. (nms)
September 12, 2016 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: The pdf for D.I. #618 has been replaced per counsel's request. The table of contents has been corrected. (nms)
September 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 630 EXHIBITS re #627 Opening Brief in Support, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit I)(McMillan, James) Modified on 9/12/2016 (nms).
September 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 628 [SEALED] MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Based on BroadWorks and Joinder in BroadSoft's Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity - filed by Google Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 9/12/2016 (nms).
September 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 627 [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re #626 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of W. Christopher Bakewell, filed by CallWave Communications LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 9/26/2016. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(McMillan, James) Modified on 9/12/2016 (nms).
September 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 626 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of W. Christopher Bakewell - filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 7.1.1 Statement)(McMillan, James) Modified on 9/12/2016 (nms).
September 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 625 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Dat Nguyen re #623 MOTION to Preclude Testimony by CallWave's Experts Philip Green and David Lucantoni Concerning Alleged Damages, by Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-7)(Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 9/12/2016 (nms).
September 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 624 [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re #623 MOTION to Preclude Testimony by CallWave's Experts Philip Green and David Lucantoni Concerning Alleged Damages, filed by Google Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 9/26/2016. (Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 9/12/2016 (nms).
September 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 623 MOTION to Preclude Testimony by CallWave's Experts Philip Green and David Lucantoni Concerning Alleged Damages - filed by Google Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 9/12/2016 (nms).
September 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 622 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Dat Nguyen re #620 MOTION to Preclude Expert Testimony of Dr. David Lucantoni on Conception, Reduction to Practice, Diligence, Secondary Considerations of Non-Obviousness, and U.S. Patent No. 6,353,660 (Burger), by Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-8, #2 Exhibits 9-10)(Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 9/12/2016 (nms).
September 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 621 [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re #620 MOTION to Preclude Expert Testimony of Dr. David Lucantoni on Conception, Reduction to Practice, Diligence, Secondary Considerations of Non-Obviousness, and U.S. Patent No. 6,353,660 (Burger), filed by Google Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 9/26/2016. (Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 9/12/2016 (nms).
September 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 620 MOTION to Preclude Expert Testimony of Dr. David Lucantoni on Conception, Reduction to Practice, Diligence, Secondary Considerations of Non-Obviousness, and U.S. Patent No. 6,353,660 (Burger) - filed by Google Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 9/12/2016 (nms).
September 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 619 DECLARATION of Dat Nguyen re #617 MOTION for Summary Judgment that All Asserted Claims of the Patents-In-Suit are Invalid Under Section 101, by Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-13)(Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 9/9/2016 (nms).
September 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 618 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #617 MOTION for Summary Judgment that All Asserted Claims of the Patents-In-Suit are Invalid Under Section 101, filed by Google Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 9/26/2016. (Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 9/9/2016 (nms). (Main Document 618 replaced on 9/12/2016) (nms).
September 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 617 MOTION for Summary Judgment that All Asserted Claims of the Patents-In-Suit are Invalid Under Section 101 - filed by Google Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 9/9/2016 (nms).
September 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 616 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Nathaniel T. Browand re #614 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of All Asserted Claims of the '110, '910, and '901 Patents Based on Prior Art, by Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibits 4-12, #5 Exhibits 13-16)(Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 9/9/2016 (nms).
September 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 615 [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re #614 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of All Asserted Claims of the '110, '910, and '901 Patents Based on Prior Art, filed by Google Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 9/26/2016. (Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 9/9/2016 (nms). (Main Document 615 replaced on 9/12/2016) (nms).
September 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 614 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of All Asserted Claims of the '110, '910, and '901 Patents Based on Prior Art - filed by Google Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 9/9/2016 (nms).
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 613 ORAL ORDER Adopting the Amended Schedule at D.I. 612 in 12-cv-1701-RGA, and D.I. 540 in 12-cv-1704-RGA. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/22/2016. Associated Cases: 12-cv-1701-RGA, 12-cv-1704-RGA(nms)
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 612 Letter to Judge Richard G. Andrews from Special Master Yvonne Takvorian Saville, dated 8/17/2016 advising of schedule. (ksr, )
August 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 611 REDACTED VERSION of #608 Letter, by Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul) Modified on 8/18/2016 (nms).
August 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 610 NOTICE of Change of Address by Benjamin J. Schladweiler (Schladweiler, Benjamin)
August 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 609 NOTICE of Name Change and Email for Megan E. Lantto Pro Hac Vice by CallWave Communications LLC (McMillan, James)
August 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 608 [SEALED] Letter to Special Master Yvonne Saville from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding '970 Track Schedule. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
July 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 607 Notice Regarding the Scheduling Order for the '970 Track, by Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul) Modified on 7/25/2016 (nms).
July 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 606 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Bryana T. McGillycuddy as co-counsel. Reason for request: She is no longer with the firm.. (McMillan, James)
July 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 605 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Google Inc.'s Responses to Plaintiff's Amended First Collective Interrogatories to '970 Track Defendants (Amended No. 3 [Sic]) filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
July 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 604 NOTICE of Deposition and Subpoena of Samuel Hoffpauir by Google Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Saindon, Paul)
July 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 603 NOTICE of Firm Telephone Number Change, by Paul Saindon (Saindon, Paul) Modified on 7/13/2016 (nms).
July 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 601 NOTICE of Change of Address by Paul Saindon (Saindon, Paul)
July 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 600 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Google Inc.'s Third Supplemental Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
June 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 602 ORDER: Ruling Provided by Special Master Yvonne T. Saville (via email). Signed by Yvonne T. Saville, Special Master on 6/30/2016. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:13-cv-00711-RGA(ksr, )
June 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 599 ORDER: Google's objections (D.I. #556 ) are OVERRULED. Google is ORDERED to produce the source code responsive to request 3-7, 20, and 24 (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/30/2016. (nms)
June 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 598 ORAL ORDER: The Court has read the joint status update. (No. 13-711, D.I. 284). The Special Master remains responsible for discovery and scheduling through to the date for the filing of dispositive and Daubert motions, including setting that date. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/29/2016. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:13-cv-00711-RGA(nms)
June 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 597 ORDER Overruling #552 Objections. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/29/2016. (nms)
June 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 596 Redaction version of (D.I. 509 in 12-cv-1702-RGA, D.I. 500 in 12-cv-1704-RGA, D.I. 523 in 12-cv-1701-RGA, D.I. 345 in 12-cv-01703-RGA) Sealed Transcript. (nms)
June 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 595 ORDER Granting CallWave Communications, LLC's Unopposed MOTION to Seal Confidential Portions of the Transcript of the Hearing Before Special Master Saville on February, 24, 2016. Signed by Special Master Yvonne Saville on 6/27/2016. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(nms)
June 27, 2016 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: The pdf for the Sealed Transcript of the February 24, 2016, conference before the Special Master has been replaced. The reference to Civil Action 13-711-RGA has been removed, and a reference to Civil Action 12-1703-RGA has been added. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(nms)
June 23, 2016 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: The pdf for exhibits A-D attached to the redacted filing dated 3/21/2016, has been replaced with an amended version per counsel's request. Exhibit B has now been fully redacted. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA(nms)
June 23, 2016 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: The pdf for exhibits A-D attached to the redacted filing dated 3/21/2016, has been replaced with an amended version per counsel's request. Exhibit B has now been fully redacted. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA(nms)
June 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 594 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Callwave Communications, LLC's Amended First Collective Interrogatories to '970 Track Defendants (1-7) filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
June 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 593 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Plaintiffs objections to the Report and Recommendation Relative to the Parties Motions to Strike and other Discovery issues are OVERRULED, and the Court ADOPTS the Rulings and Recommendations Relative to the Parties Motions to Strike and other Discovery Issues. Plaintiffs motion to strike (D.I. 427; No. 12-1702, D.I. 446; No. 12-1704, D.I. 407; No. 13-711, D.I. 241) is DENIED. Defendants motion to strike (D.I. 448; No. 12-1702, D.I. 457; No. 12-1704, D.I. 407; No. 13-711, D.I. 252) is DENIED. The motion to expedite the briefing (D.I. 429, No. 12-1702, D.I. 447; No. 12-1704, D.I. 408; No. 13-711, D.I. 242) is DISMISSED as moot. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/16/2016. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:13-cv-00711-RGA(nms)
June 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 592 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from James G. McMillan, III regarding response to Court's Oral Order issued earlier today. (McMillan, James) Modified on 6/15/2016 (nms).
June 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 591 ORAL ORDER: CallWave is directed to send a letter to the Court today advising whether the depositions of Dr. Elderling and Mr. Hoffpauir have occurred, or are scheduled, and, if so, when. Further, if they have occurred, and were after December 17, 2015, were they questioned about "Shared Call Appearance"?. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/15/2016. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:13-cv-00711-RGA(nms)
June 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 590 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Christopher Boundy as co-counsel. Reason for request: no longer with firm. (McMillan, James)
June 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 589 REDACTED VERSION of #579 Memorandum in Opposition, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-F, #2 Exhibit G-S, #3 Exhibit T-Z, #4 Exhibit AA-KK, #5 Exhibit LL-OO)(McMillan, James)
June 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 588 REDACTED VERSION of #582 Response to Objections, by Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-C, #2 Exhibits D-O)(Saindon, Paul) Modified on 6/2/2016 (nms).
June 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 587 REDACTED VERSION of #581 Appendix, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Appendix A - Exhibits A-J, #3 Appendix A - Exhibits K-T, #4 Appendix A - Exhibits U-Z, #5 Appendix B, #6 Appendix B - Exhibits A-K, #7 Appendix C, #8 Appendix C - Exhibits 1-17, #9 Appendix C - Exhibits 18-27, #10 Appendix C - Exhibits A-B, #11 Appendix D, #12 Appendix D - Exhibits A-I, #13 Appendix D - Exhibits J-W, #14 Appendix D- Exhibits X-AA)(McMillan, James)
June 2, 2016 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: D.I. 585 and 586 have been removed from the docket. These filings were redactions of D.I. 579 , and should have been filed together consistent with the way D.I. 579 was filed. Counsel shall refile accordingly. (nms)
June 2, 2016 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: D.I. 585 and 586 have been removed from the docket. These filings were redactions of D.I. #579 , and should have been filed together consistent with the way D.I. #579 was filed. Counsel shall refile accordingly. (nms)
May 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 584 MULTI MEDIA DOCUMENT (Exhibit LL), filed by CallWave Communications LLC in the form of a DVD. Filing related to #580 Notice of Filing. (Media on file in Clerk's Office). (nms)
May 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 583 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding request for oral argument - re #556 Objections. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
May 27, 2016 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: The pdf for the Certificate of Service filed at D.I. 580 has been corrected to remove the duplication of the Notice of Filing. (nms)
May 27, 2016 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: The pdf for the Certificate of Service filed at D.I. #580 has been corrected to remove the duplication of the Notice of Filing. (nms)
May 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 582 [SEALED] Response to #552 Objections, by Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-C, #2 Exhibits D-O)(Saindon, Paul) Modified on 5/27/2016 (nms).
May 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 581 [SEALED] APPENDIX re #579 Sealed Response, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Part A, #2 Part A and Exhibits A-J, #3 Exhibits K-T, #4 Exhibit U-Z, #5 Part B, #6 Part B, #7 Part B and exhibits A-K, #8 Part C Letter, #9 Part C and Exhibits 1-17, #10 Exhibit 18-27 and A-B, #11 part D, #12 Part D Exhibits A-I, #13 part D Exhibits J-W, #14 Part D Exhibits X-AA)(McMillan, James) Modified on 5/27/2016 (nms).
May 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 580 NOTICE of Exhibit LL to Docket Item 579 by CallWave Communications LLC re #579 Memorandum in Opposition, (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(McMillan, James) (Attachment 1 replaced on 5/27/2016) (nms).
May 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 579 [SEALED] Response to #556 Objections, filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-F, #2 Exhibits G-S, #3 Exhibits T-Z, #4 Exhibits AA-KK, #5 Exhibits LL-OO, #6 Certificate of Service)(McMillan, James) Modified on 5/27/2016 (nms). Modified on 5/27/2016 (nms).
May 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 578 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority (In re: TLI Communications) by Google Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Saindon, Paul)
May 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 577 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority In Support Of Callwave Communications, LLC's Brief In Opposition To Defendants' Renewed Motion For Judgment On The Pleadings That All Asserted Claims Of The '970 Patent Are Invalid Under 101, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(McMillan, James) Modified on 5/19/2016 (nms).
May 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 576 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from James G. McMillan, III requesting oral argument only on Callwave's Objections to Portions of the Special Master's March 29, 2016 Order. (McMillan, James) Modified on 5/16/2016 (nms).
May 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 575 REDACTED VERSION of #571 Response to Objections, by Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits O-DD)(Saindon, Paul) Modified on 5/16/2016 (nms).
May 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 574 REDACTED VERSION of #570 Response to Objections, by Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-N)(Saindon, Paul) Modified on 5/16/2016 (nms).
May 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 573 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from James G. McMillan, III requesting oral argument. (McMillan, James) Modified on 5/13/2016 (nms).
May 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 572 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Google's Third Supplemental Responses to Plaintiff's Third [sic] Interrogatories to Google relating to the '970 Track (7-9) filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
May 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 571 [SEALED] RESPONSE, Volume II to #554 Objections, by Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits O-R, #2 Exhibit S, part 1, #3 Exhibit S, part 2, #4 Exhibit S, part 3, #5 Exhibit T, part 1, #6 Exhibit T, part 2, #7 Exhibit T, part 3, #8 Exhibits U-DD)(Saindon, Paul) Modified on 5/10/2016 (nms). Modified on 5/10/2016 (nms).
May 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 570 [SEALED] RESPONSE, Volume I to #554 Objections, by Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-H, #2 Exhibits I-M, #3 Exhibit N)(Saindon, Paul) Modified on 5/10/2016 (nms).
May 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 569 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Notice of Deposition to Ankit Gupta Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30 to commence on May 10, 2016 filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
May 3, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #560 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for responses to objections, filed by Google Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/2/2016. (nms)
May 3, 2016 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: The link in D.I. 567 has been corrected to reflect the filing is a redaction of the appendix at D.I. 555 not a redaction of D.I. 554 . (nms)
May 3, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 560 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for responses to objections, filed by Google Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/2/2016. (nms)
May 3, 2016 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: The link in D.I. #567 has been corrected to reflect the filing is a redaction of the appendix at D.I. #555 not a redaction of D.I. #554 . (nms)
May 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 568 ORDER: Ruling Provided by Special Master Yvonne T. Saville regarding Hearing held on 3/23/2016 (via email). Signed by Special Master Yvonne T. Saville on 3/29/2015. Signed by Yvonne T. Saville, Special Master on 3/29/2016. (ksr, )
April 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 567 REDACTED VERSION of #555 Appendix, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Part 1, #2 Part 2, #3 Part 3, #4 Part 4, #5 Part 5, #6 Part 6)(McMillan, James) Modified on 5/3/2016 (nms). Modified on 5/3/2016 (nms).
April 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 566 REDACTED VERSION of #554 Objections, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-Z, #2 Exhibits AA-TT)(McMillan, James) Modified on 5/3/2016 (nms).
April 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 565 REDACTED VERSION of #553 Appendix, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Appendix B, #3 Appendix C)(McMillan, James) Modified on 5/3/2016 (nms).
April 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 564 REDACTED VERSION of #552 Objections to Special Master's March 23, 2016 Order, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-E)(McMillan, James) Modified on 5/3/2016 (nms).
April 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 563 NOTICE of Petition for Covered Business Method Review by Google Inc. (Attachments: #1 Petition)(Blumenfeld, Jack)
April 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 562 REDACTED VERSION of #557 Declaration by Google Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
April 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 561 REDACTED VERSION of #556 Objections by Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 29)(Blumenfeld, Jack)
April 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 560 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for responses to objections - filed by Google Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 5/3/2016 (nms).
April 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 559 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Google Inc.'s Supplemental Responses to Plaintiff's First Collective Interrogatories to '970 Track Defendants (1-7) filed by Google Inc..(Blumenfeld, Jack)
April 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 558 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority In Support Of Brief In Opposition To Defendants' Renewed Motion For Judgment On The Pleadings That All Asserted Claims Of The '970 Patent Are Invalid Under 101, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibits E-G)(McMillan, James) Modified on 4/28/2016 (nms). Modified on 4/29/2016 (nms).
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 557 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Michael Sabolish re #556 Objections, by Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul) Modified on 4/25/2016 (nms).
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 556 [SEALED] OBJECTIONS to Discovery Rulings on the '970 Track (D.I. #568 ), by Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-29)(Saindon, Paul) Modified on 4/25/2016 (nms). Modified on 5/27/2016 (nms).
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 555 [SEALED] APPENDIX re #554 Objections, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 part 1, #2 part 2, #3 part 3, #4 part 4, #5 part 5, #6 part 6, #7 part 7, #8 part 8, #9 9, #10 Certificate of Service)(McMillan, James) Modified on 4/25/2016 (nms).
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 554 [SEALED] OBJECTIONS to Portions of the Special Master's March 29, 2016 Order(D.I. #568 ), by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-E, #2 Exhibit F, #3 Exhibit G, #4 Exhibits H-T, #5 Exhibit U, #6 Exhibit V, #7 Exhibits W-Z, #8 Exhibits AA-EE, #9 Exhibit FF, #10 Exhibit GG, #11 Exhibit HH, #12 Exhibit II, #13 Exhibits JJ-LL, #14 Exhibit MM, #15 Exhibits NN-QQ, #16 Exhibit RR, #17 Exhibit SS-TT, #18 Certificate of Service)(McMillan, James) Modified on 4/25/2016 (nms). Modified on 5/3/2016 (nms).
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 553 [SEALED] APPENDIX re #552 Objections, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Appendix B, #3 Appendix C, #4 Certificate of Service)(McMillan, James) Modified on 4/22/2016 (nms).
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 552 [SEALED] OBJECTIONS to #544 Ruling on Costs (see Transcript at D.I. #544 ), by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1Exhibits A-E, #2 Certificate of Service)(McMillan, James) Modified on 4/22/2016 (nms).
April 18, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED Granting 551 Stipulation and Order extending objection deadline, filed by Google Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/18/2016. (nms)
April 18, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED Granting #551 Stipulation and Order extending objection deadline, filed by Google Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/18/2016. (nms)
April 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 551 STIPULATION regarding due date for objections to Special Masters March 23, 2016 and March 29, 2016 rulings and orders by Google Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
April 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 550 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Callwave Communications, LLC's Supplemental Objections and Responses to Google Inc's Individual Requests for Admission (Requests for Admissions 1-3, 21-26, 28 to Plaintiff Relating to the '970 Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
April 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 549 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Callwave Communications, LLC's Supplemental Objections and Responses to Defendants' Collective Requests for Admission (Requests for Admissions 6, 8-12, 18, 20, 27, 29) to Plaintiff Relating to the '970 Track, filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
April 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 548 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Amended Notice of Deposition to Marc Stogaitis Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(1) to commence on April 15, 2016 filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
April 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 547 REDACTED VERSION of #537 MOTION to Seal, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-D)(McMillan, James) Modified on 4/4/2016 (nms).
April 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 546 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Callwave Communications, LLC's Third Supplemental Responses and Objections to Google's First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff Relating to the '970 Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
March 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 545 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Google's Second Supplemental Responses to Plaintiff's Third [Sic] Interrogatories to Google Relating to the '970 Track (7-9) filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
March 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 544 [SEALED] Transcript of Special Master Hearing held on 3/23/2016 before Judge Special Master Yvonne Takvorian Saville. (ksr, )
March 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 543 7.1.1 Certification by CallWave Communications LLC re MOTION to Seal.(McMillan, James) Modified on 3/31/2016 (nms).
March 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 542 REDACTED VERSION of #535 Letter by Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul)
March 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 541 REDACTED VERSION of #534 Letter by Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul)
March 29, 2016 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: The redacted filing filed at D.I. 538 and D.I. 539 have been removed from the docket as they were not linked to the sealed filings they were in reference to. Counsel will refile accordingly. (nms)
March 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 540 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Google's Responses to Plaintiff's Fifth Interrogatories to Google Relating to the 970 Track (10); and (2) Google's Responses to Plaintiff's Fifth Requests for Production to Google Related to the 970 Track (23-28) filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
March 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 537 [SEALED] MOTION to Seal Confidential Portions of the Transcript of the Hearing Before Special Master Saville on February 24, 2016- filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(McMillan, James) Modified on 3/29/2016 (nms).
March 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 536 Amended TRANSCRIPT REQUEST, by CallWave Communications LLC - Amended - Transcript is Already on File. (McMillan, James) Modified on 3/29/2016 (nms).
March 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 535 [SEALED] Letter to Special Master Saville from Paul Saindon regarding Sabolish. (Saindon, Paul)
March 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 534 [SEALED] Letter to Special Master Saville from Paul Saindon regarding Callwave's Deficiences. (Saindon, Paul)
March 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 533 REDACTED VERSION of #530 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Transcript, by Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-D, #2 Proposed Order)(Saindon, Paul) Modified on 3/21/2016 (nms). (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/23/2016) (nms).
March 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 532 Official Transcript of Section 101 Motion held on 03-16-16 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leonard A. Dibbs. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/11/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/19/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/17/2016. (lad)
March 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 531 ORDER Granting [SEALED] Unopposed MOTION to Seal the Transcript of hearing held on 2/24/2016. Signed by Yvonne Saville, Special Master on 3/16/2016. Associated Cases: 12-cv-1701-RGA, 12-cv-01702-RGA, 12-cv-1703-RGA, 12-cv-1704-RGA(ksr, ) Modified on 6/20/2016 (nms).
March 15, 2016 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: A proposed order has been added to the Unopposed Motion to Seal Confidential Portions of the Transcript of the Hearing Before Special Master Saville on February 24, 2016, filed on March 14, 2016. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(nms)
March 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 530 [SEALED] Unopposed MOTION to Seal Transcript - filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-D)(Saindon, Paul) Modified on 3/15/2016 (nms). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/15/2016: #2 Proposed Order) (nms).
March 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 529 NOTICE of Subsequent Authority (Peschke Map Technologies LLC v. Rouse Properties Inc.) by Google Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Saindon, Paul)
March 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 528 NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA for the Federal Circuit re #526 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit), filed by CallWave Communications LLC. USCA Case Number 16-1684. (nms)
March 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 527 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by CallWave Communications LLC for proceedings held on February 9, 2016 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Transcript Not Needed. (McMillan, James) Modified on 3/10/2016 (nms).
March 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 526 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Federal Circuit of #501 Order, #503 Judgment, . Appeal filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James)
March 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 525 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Notice of Deposition to Marc Stogaitis Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30 to commence on March 18, 2016 filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
March 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Notification regarding 526 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit) sent to Reporter Dibbs. (cna)
March 10, 2016 Opinion or Order APPEAL - Credit Card Payment of $505.00 received re #526 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit) filed by CallWave Communications LLC. ( Filing fee $505, receipt number 0311-1892637.) (McMillan, James)
March 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Notification regarding #526 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit) sent to Reporter Dibbs. (cna)
March 10, 2016 Opinion or Order APPEAL - Credit Card Payment of $505.00 received re 526 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit) filed by CallWave Communications LLC. ( Filing fee $505, receipt number 0311-1892637.) (McMillan, James)
March 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 524 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Google's Response to Plaintiff's Third Interrogatories to Google Relating to the '970 Track (6); and (2) Google's Responses to Plaintiff's Third [sic] Interrogatories to Google Relating to the 970 Track (7-9) filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
March 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 523 SEALED Official Transcript of Discovery Conference held on 2/24/2016 before Judge Special Master Yvonne T. Saville. Court Reporter/Transcriber Basye Santiago Reporting,Telephone number 302-573-2300. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA -RGA(ksr, ) Modified on 3/9/2016 (ksr, ). Modified on 6/20/2016 (nms). (Main Document 523 replaced on 6/27/2016) (nms).
March 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 522 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Notice of Deposition to James Maccoun Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30 to commence on March 11, 2016 filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
March 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 521 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Fifth Supplemental Responses to Defendant' First Common Set of Interrogatories Relating to the '970 Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
March 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 520 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Google Inc.'s Supplemental Responses to Plaintiff's Second Collective Interrogatories to'970 Track Defendants (8) filed by AT&T Mobility LLC.(Saindon, Paul)
March 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 519 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Second Supplemental Responses and Objections to Google's First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff Callwave Communications, LLC Relating to the '970 Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
March 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 518 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Response and Objections to Defendants' Notice of Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition to Plaintiff Callwave Communications, LLC Related to the '970 Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
March 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 517 REDACTED VERSION of #513 Letter, by Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul) Modified on 3/1/2016 (nms).
March 1, 2016 Opinion or Order REDACTION NOTICE: In accordance with section G of the Administrative Procedures Governing Filing and Service by Electronic Means, redacted versions of sealed documents shall be filed electronically within 7 days of the filing of the sealed document. The records of this case do not reflect the filing of a redacted version of DI #513 . (nms)
March 1, 2016 Opinion or Order REDACTION NOTICE: In accordance with section G of the Administrative Procedures Governing Filing and Service by Electronic Means, redacted versions of sealed documents shall be filed electronically within 7 days of the filing of the sealed document. The records of this case do not reflect the filing of a redacted version of DI # 513 . (nms)
February 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 516 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Notice of Deposition to Michael Sabolish Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30 to commence on March 11, 2016 filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
February 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 515 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) Plaintiff's Fifth Interrogatories To Google, Inc. Relating To The '970 Track (10) and 2) Plaintiff's Fifth Requests For Production To Google, Inc. Related To The '970 Track (23-28) filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
February 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 514 REDACTED VERSION of #505 MOTION to Redact Transcript of the Hearing Before Special Master Saville on January 8, 2016, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits C-D)(McMillan, James) Modified on 2/19/2016 (nms).
February 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 513 [SEALED] Letter to Special Master Saville from Paul Saindon regarding Discovery. (Saindon, Paul)
February 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 512 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Google's Supplemental Responses to Plaintiff's Second Interrogatories to Google Relating to the '970 Track (Nos. 2-5) filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
February 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 511 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Google Inc.'s Supplemental Responses and Objections to Callwave Communications, LLC's First Interrogatories to Google Regarding the '970 Track filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
February 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 510 Redaction version of #494 Transcript. (nms)
February 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 509 ORDER Granting (498 in 12-cv-1702-RGA, 485 in 12-cv-1704-RGA, 505 in 12-cv-1701-RGA) MOTION to Redact Transcript of the Hearing Before Special Master Saville on January 8, 2016. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/17/2016. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(nms)
February 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 508 7.1.1. Statement by CallWave Communications LLC re MOTION to Redact Transcript of the Hearing Before Special Master Saville on January 8, 2016. (McMillan, James) Modified on 2/17/2016 (nms).
February 16, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (504 in 12-cv-1701-RGA, 283 in 12-cv-1788-RGA, 484 in 12-cv-1704-RGA) Stipulation Amended Scheduling Order (see Stipulation for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/16/2016. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
February 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 507 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Google's Objections to Plaintiff's Third [Sic] Interrogatories to Google Relating to the '970 Track (7-9), (2) Google's Responses to Plaintiff's Third Requests for Production to Google Related to the '970 Track (19-22), (3) Google's Responses to Plaintiff's First Collective Requests for Admission to All Defendants Regarding the '970 Track (1-10) and (4) Google's Responses to Plaintiff's First Individual Requests for Admission to Google Inc. Regarding the '970 Track (1-28) filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
February 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 506 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Declaration of Michael Sabolish filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
February 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 505 [SEALED] MOTION to Redact Transcript of the Hearing Before Special Master Saville on January 8, 2016 - filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(McMillan, James) Modified on 2/16/2016 (nms).
February 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 504 STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Amend Scheduling Order, by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James) Modified on 2/16/2016 (nms).
February 11, 2016 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: The transcript filed at D.I. 504 has been removed from the docket. Counsel has been instructed to contact Chambers. (nms)
February 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 503 FINAL JUDGMENT in favor of Defendants and against Callwave on the claims for infringement of claims 13-17 of the '933 Patent (see Judgment for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/9/2016. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms) Modified on 2/9/2016 (nms).
February 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 502 PROPOSED Final Judgment, by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James) Modified on 2/9/2016 (nms).
February 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 501 ORDER Granting (417 in 12-cv-1702-RGA, 373 in 12-cv-1704-RGA, 237 in 12-cv-1788-RGA, 308 in 12-cv-1703-RGA, 394 in 12-cv-1701-RGA) MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b). Plaintiff is DIRECTED to submit within five days a jointly agreed order to accomplish the above (see Order for details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/3/2016. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
February 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 500 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Google's Objection to Plaintiff's Third Interrogatories to Google Relating to the '970 Track (6) filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
January 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 499 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Submit Joint Status Letter to one week after completion of summary judgment and Daubert motion briefing - filed by Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul)
January 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 498 ORAL ORDER: The Court will hear oral argument on the Renewed Motions for Judgment on the Pleadings that All Asserted Claims of the '970 Patent are Invalid under Section 101 (D.I. 439 in 12-cv-1701-RGA, D.I. 249 in 12-cv-1788-RGA, D.I. 419 in 12-cv-01704-RGA) on 3/16/2016, at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/29/2016. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
January 29, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (278 in 13-cv-711-RGA, 494 in 12-cv-1702-RGA, 479 in 12-cv-1704-RGA, 499 in 12-cv-1701-RGA) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Submit Joint Status Letter to one week after completion of summary judgment and Daubert motion briefing. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/29/2016. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:13-cv-00711-RGA(nms)
January 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 497 REDACTED VERSION of #493 Appendix, by Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-S)(Saindon, Paul) Modified on 1/26/2016 (nms).
January 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 496 REDACTED VERSION of #492 Response to Objections, by Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul) Modified on 1/26/2016 (nms).
January 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 495 REQUEST for Oral Argument by CallWave Communications LLC re (263 in 13-cv-711-RGA, 469 in 12-cv-01702-RGA, 470 in 12-cv-1701-RGA, 448 in 12-cv-1704-RGA) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. (McMillan, James) Modified on 1/26/2016 (nms).
January 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 494 SEALED Official Transcript of Special Master Hearing held on 1/8/2016 before Special Master Saville. Court Reporter/Transcriber Wilcox & Fetzer,Telephone number 302-655-0477. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(ksr, ) Modified on 2/17/2016 (nms).
January 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 493 [SEALED] APPENDIX re Response to Objections, by Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Part 2)(Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 1/20/2016 (nms).
January 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 492 [SEALED] Response To Objections, by Google Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 1/20/2016 (nms).
January 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 491 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Final Invalidity Contentions on the '970 Patent filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
January 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 490 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Plaintiffs First Collective Requests for Admission to All Defendants Relating to the 970 Track (1-10); (2) Plaintiffs First Individual Requests for Admission to Google, Inc. Regarding the 970 Track (1-28); (3) Plaintiffs Third Interrogatories to Google, Inc. Relating to the 970 Track (7-9); (4) Plaintiffs Third Requests for Production to Google Related to the 970 Track (19-22) filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
January 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 489 REDACTED Version of re #476 Sealed Appendix, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(McMillan, James) Modified on 1/12/2016 (nms).
January 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 488 REDACTED VERSION of #478 Letter, by Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul) Modified on 1/12/2016 (nms).
January 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 487 REDACTED VERSION of #479 Letter, by Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul) Modified on 1/12/2016 (nms).
January 12, 2016 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: D.I. 486 has been removed from the docket. Counsel shall refile the redacted filing which shall include a captioned cover page. (nms)
January 12, 2016 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: D.I. 486 has been removed from the docket as it was improperly linked to the filing it was redacting. Counsel shall refile accordingly. (nms)
January 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 485 REDACTED VERSION of #474 Objections, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-B)(McMillan, James) Modified on 1/12/2016 (nms).
January 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 484 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Third Supplemental Disclosure of Infringement Contentions designated Restricted Confidential - Source Code against Google Inc. filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
January 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 483 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Collective Reduced Set of Prior Art in the '970 Track filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
January 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 482 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Second Supplemental Invalidity Contentions on the '970 Patent filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
January 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 481 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Google's Second Supplemental Invalidity Contentions on the '970 Patent filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
January 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 480 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Collective and Google Inc.'s, Blackberry's and Verizon's Individual Requests for Admission to Plaintiff Callwave Communications, LLC Relating to the '970 Track filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
January 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 479 [SEALED] Letter to Special Master Saville from Paul Saindon regarding Response to Callwave's 1/6/16 Letter. (Saindon, Paul)
January 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 478 [SEALED] Letter to Special Master Saville from Paul Saindon regarding Discovery. (Saindon, Paul)
January 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 477 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Third Interrogatories to Defendant Google Inc. Relating to the '970 Track (6) filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
January 5, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (473 in 12-cv-1701-RGA, 472 in 12-cv-1702-RGA, 451 in 12-cv-1704-RGA, 267 in 13-cv-711-RGA) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties to submit a joint status letter to January 29, 2016, filed by Broadsoft Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/4/2016. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:13-cv-00711-RGA(nms)
January 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 476 [SEALED] APPENDIX B re #474 Objections, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Part 1, #2 Part 2, #3 Part 3, #4 Part 4, #5 Part 5, #6 Part 6, #7 Part 7, #8 Part 8, #9 Part 9, #10 Part 10, #11 C Part 1, #12 C Part 2), #13 C Part 3, #14 Certificate of Service)(McMillan, James) Modified on 1/5/2016 (nms).
January 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 475 APPENDIX A re #474 Objections, by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James) Modified on 1/5/2016 (nms).
January 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 474 [SEALED] OBJECTIONS by CallWave Communications LLC to #470 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Certificate of Service)(McMillan, James) Modified on 1/5/2016 (nms).
December 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 473 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties to submit a joint status letter to January 29, 2016 - filed by Google Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
December 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 472 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Second Supplemental Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
December 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 471 NOTICE of Withdrawal requesting Clerk to remove Edmond D. Johnson, formerly of Pepper Hamilton LLP as lead counsel. Reason for request: no longer with firm. by CallWave Communications LLC (McMillan, James)
December 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 470 RULINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master Yvonne Takvorian Saville. Please note that when filing Objections pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b)(2), briefing consists solely of the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages) and the Response to the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages). No further briefing shall be permitted with respect to objections without leave of the Court. Objections to R&R due by 1/4/2016. Signed by Yvonne Takvorian Saville on 12/10/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:13-cv-00711-RGA(ksr, )
December 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 469 REDACTED VERSION of #464 Letter, by Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-K)(Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 12/14/2015 (nms).
December 14, 2015 Opinion or Order REDACTION NOTICE: In accordance with section G of the Administrative Procedures Governing Filing and Service by Electronic Means, redacted versions of sealed documents shall be filed electronically within 7 days of the filing of the sealed document. The records of this case do not reflect the filing of a redacted version of DI #464 . (nms)
December 14, 2015 Opinion or Order REDACTION NOTICE: In accordance with section G of the Administrative Procedures Governing Filing and Service by Electronic Means, redacted versions of sealed documents shall be filed electronically within 7 days of the filing of the sealed document. The records of this case do not reflect the filing of a redacted version of DI # 464 . (nms)
December 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 468 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Fourth Supplemental Responses to Defendants' First Common Set of Interrogatories Relating to the '970 Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
December 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 467 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Second Supplemental Disclosure of Infringement Contentions against Google Inc. filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
December 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 466 REDACTED VERSION of #463 Reply Brief, by Broadsoft Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 36-48)(Mayo, Andrew) Modified on 12/8/2015 (nms).
December 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 465 Letter to the Honorable Ricahrd G. Andrews from Paul Saindon regarding Request for Oral Argument on Renewed Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings that All Asserted Claims of the '970 Patent are Invalid under Section 101. (Saindon, Paul) Modified on 12/4/2015 (nms).
December 4, 2015 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: The redaction notice filed on 12/4/2015, has been removed as it was entered in error. (nms)
December 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 464 [SEALED] Letter to Special Master Yvonne Takvorian Saville from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding response to CallWave's November 30, 2015 Letter. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
December 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 463 [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re #448 Cross-Motion to Strike Testimony of Dr. Lucantoni filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 36-48)(Blumenfeld, Jack)
November 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 462 REPLY BRIEF re #439 Renewed Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings that All Asserted Claims of the '970 Patent are Invalid under Section 101 filed by Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul)
November 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 461 REDACTED VERSION of #458 Answering Brief in Opposition, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit K, #3 Exhibit L)(McMillan, James) Modified on 12/1/2015 (nms).
November 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 460 SCHEDULING ORDER for the remainder of the '970 Track: Fact Discovery completed by 2/12/2016. Daubert and Dispositive Motions due by 5/27/2016 (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/24/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
November 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 459 EXHIBITS re #458 Reply Brief, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits B-E, #2 Exhibits F-J, #3 Certificate of Service)(McMillan, James) Modified on 11/24/2015 (nms).
November 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 458 [SEALED] Reply BRIEF re #427 MOTION To Strike Testimony of Dr. Eldering and Associated Document Productions, and In Opposition to #448 Cross Motion to Strike Testimony of Dr. Lucantoni, filed by CallWave Communications LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 12/3/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit K, #3 Exhibit L, #4 Certificate of Service)(McMillan, James) Modified on 11/24/2015 (nms). Modified on 11/24/2015 (nms).
November 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 457 PROPOSED Scheduling Order, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Letter)(McMillan, James) Modified on 11/24/2015 (nms).
November 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 456 NOTICE OF SERVICE of a subpoena on Sprint Spectrum L.P. and Sprint Communications Company L.P. filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(McMillan, James)
November 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 455 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Google Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's Third Requests for Production to Google Related to the '970 Track (18) filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
November 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 454 REDACTED VERSION of #449 Declaration of Stephen P. McBride, by Google Inc., Broadsoft Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-35)(Mayo, Andrew) Modified on 11/17/2015 (nms).
November 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 453 REDACTED VERSION of #448 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Google Inc., Broadsoft Inc.. (Mayo, Andrew) Modified on 11/17/2015 (nms).
November 17, 2015 Opinion or Order REDACTION NOTICE: In accordance with section G of the Administrative Procedures Governing Filing and Service by Electronic Means, redacted versions of sealed documents shall be filed electronically within 7 days of the filing of the sealed document. The records of this case do not reflect the filing of redacted versions of DI #448 and #449 . (nms)
November 17, 2015 Opinion or Order REDACTION NOTICE: In accordance with section G of the Administrative Procedures Governing Filing and Service by Electronic Means, redacted versions of sealed documents shall be filed electronically within 7 days of the filing of the sealed document. The records of this case do not reflect the filing of redacted versions of DI # 448 and 449 . (nms)
November 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 452 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #439 Renewed Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings that All Asserted Claims of the '970 Patent are Invalid under Section 101 filed by CallWave Communications LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 11/27/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(McMillan, James)
November 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 451 MULTI MEDIA DOCUMENT (Exhibit to the Memorandum in Opposition to the Motion to Strike), filed by Google Inc., and Broadsoft Inc. in the form of a CD-ROM. Filing related to (450 in 12-cv-1701-RGA, 459 in 12-cv-01702-RGA, 429 in 12-cv-1704-RGA, 254 in 13-cv-711-RGA) Notice of Filing Multi Media Materials. (Media on file in Clerk's Office). Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:13-cv-00711-RGA(nms)
November 6, 2015 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: The Sealed Notice of Multi-Media filing filed on 11/5/2015, has been unsealed. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:13-cv-00711-RGA(nms)
November 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 450 NOTICE of filing the following Non-Paper material(s) in multi media format: DVD. Original Non-paper material(s) to be filed with the Clerk's Office. Notice filed by John G. Day on behalf of Broadsoft Inc. (Day, John) Modified on 11/6/2015 (nms).
November 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 449 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Stephen P. McBride re #448 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Broadsoft Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibits 3-10, #4 Exhibits 11-20, #5 Exhibits 21, 22, 23, 25, 26, 27, 28, 29, 30, #6 Exhibit 31-35)(Day, John) Modified on 11/6/2015 (nms).
November 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 448 [SEALED] CROSS-Motion to Strike Testimony of Dr. Lucantoni, and ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #427 MOTION To Strike Testimony of Dr. Eldering and Associated Document Productions, filed by Google Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 11/16/2015. (Day, John) Modified on 11/24/2015 (nms).
November 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 447 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoena on Skyhook Wireless, Inc., c/o Corporation Service Company filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(McMillan, James)
November 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 446 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoena on TracBeam, LLC filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(McMillan, James)
November 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 445 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Callwave Communications, LLC's Supplemental Identification of Accused Products and Asserted Claims against Google Inc. filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
October 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 444 ORDER Regarding Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions due date (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/30/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:13-cv-00711-RGA(nms)
October 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 443 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoena on Sprint Nextel Corp. filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(McMillan, James)
October 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 442 Official Transcript of Scheduling Conference held on 10-29-15 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leonard A. Dibbs. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/20/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/30/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/28/2016. (lad)
October 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 441 PROPOSED ORDER regarding Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions, by Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Letter)(Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 10/30/2015 (nms).
October 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Ashlee Lin for Google Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(dmp, )
October 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Christopher J. Gaspar for Google Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(dmp, )
October 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Philip T. Chen for Google Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(dmp, )
October 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Mark C. Scarsi for Google Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(dmp, )
October 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Dat Nguyen for Google Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(dmp, )
October 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Nathaniel T. Browand for Google Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(dmp, )
October 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Set Answering Brief Deadline re 438 MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order. Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 11/16/2015. (nms)
October 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Set Answering Brief Deadline re #438 MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order. Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 11/16/2015. (nms)
October 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 440 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #439 Renewed Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings that All Asserted Claims of the '970 Patent are Invalid under Section 101, filed by Google Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 11/16/2015. (Saindon, Paul) Modified on 10/28/2015 (nms).
October 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 439 Renewed Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings that All Asserted Claims of the '970 Patent are Invalid under Section 101 - filed by Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul) Modified on 10/28/2015 (nms).
October 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 438 MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order - filed by Broadsoft Inc.. (Day, John) Modified on 10/28/2015 (nms).
October 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 437 PROPOSED Scheduling Order re '970 Track, by Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul) Modified on 10/27/2015 (nms).
October 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 436 PROPOSED Scheduling Order, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Johnson, Edmond) Modified on 10/27/2015 (nms).
October 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 435 ORDER: Referring the motion to strike and motion to expedite to the Special Master. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/23/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:13-cv-00711-RGA(nms)
October 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 434 REDACTED VERSION of #428 MEMORANDUM in Support, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-B, #2 Exhibits D-J, #3 Exhibits K-T, #4 Exhibits U-Z, #5 Exhibits AA-JJ)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/23/2015 (nms).
October 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 433 REDACTED VERSION of #427 MOTION To Strike Testimony of Dr. Eldering and Associated Document Productions, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 7.1.1 Statement)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/23/2015 (nms).
October 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 432 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding opposition to Callwave's Motion to Shorten the Briefing Schedule. (Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 10/23/2015 (nms).
October 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 431 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Callwave Communications, LLC's Third Requests for Production to Google Inc. Related to the '970 Track (18) filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
October 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 430 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Motion to Strike Testimony of Dr. Eldering and Associated Document Productions and Memorandum in Support thereof, together with Exhibits A through JJ filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
October 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 429 MOTION to Expedite Briefing on Motion to Strike - filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 7.1.1 Statement)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/19/2015 (nms).
October 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 428 [SEALED] MEMORANDUM in Support re #427 MOTION To Strike Testimony of Dr. Eldering and Associated Document Productions, filed by CallWave Communications LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 11/2/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit D, #4 Exhibit E, #5 Exhibit F, #6 Exhibit G, #7 Exhibit H, #8 Exhibit I, #9 Exhibit J, #10 Exhibit K, #11 Exhibit L, #12 Exhibit M, #13 Exhibit N, #14 Exhibit O, #15 Exhibit P, #16 Exhibit Q, #17 Exhibit R, #18 Exhibit S, #19 Exhibit T, #20 Exhibit U, #21 Exhibit V, #22 Exhibit W, #23 Exhibit X, #24 Exhibit Y, #25 Exhibit Z, #26 Exhibit AA, #27 Exhibit BB, #28 Exhibit CC, #29 Exhibit DD, #30 Exhibit EE, #31 Exhibit FF, #32 Exhibit GG, #33 Exhibit HH, #34 Exhibit II, #35 Exhibit JJ)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/19/2015 (nms).
October 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 427 [SEALED] MOTION To Strike Testimony of Dr. Eldering and Associated Document Productions - filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 7.1.1 Statement)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/19/2015 (nms).
October 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 426 Order Setting Rule 16(b) Conference: A Scheduling Conference is set for 10/29/2015, at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/15/2015. (nms)
October 13, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (405 in 12-cv-1704-RGA, 239 in 13-cv-711-RGA, 444 in 12-cv-1702-RGA, 425 in 12-cv-1701-RGA) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for expert discovery and dispositive motions to various dates from October 14, 2015 through and including December 7, 2015, filed by CallWave Communications LLC (Reset Deadlines: Daubert/Dispositive Motions due by 11/4/2015) (see Stipulation for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/13/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:13-cv-00711-RGA(nms)
October 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 425 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for expert discovery and dispositive motions to various dates from October 14, 2015 through and including December 7, 2015 - filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (Johnson, Edmond)
October 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 424 ORAL ORDER: The MOTION to Lift Stay of Proceedings on the '970 Patent (412 in 12-cv-1701-RGA, 239 in 12-cv-1788-RGA, 391 in 12-cv-1704-RGA) is GRANTED. The hearing scheduled for 10/9/2015, is CANCELED. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/7/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
October 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 423 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding oral argument on CallWave's Motion to Lift the Stay of Proceedings on the '970 Patent scheduled for Friday, October 9, 2015. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
October 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 422 Supplemental Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Alphabet Inc. for Google Inc. filed by Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul)
October 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 421 ORAL ORDER: The Court will hold a hearing on the Motions to Lift Stay of Proceedings on the '970 Patent (D.I. 412 in 12-cv-1701-RGA, 239 in 12-cv-1788-RGA, 391 in 12-cv-1704-RGA) on 10/9/2015, at 1:00 PM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/1/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
September 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 420 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Reply Expert Report of Dr. Eric Burger Regarding Invalidity of U.S. Patent Nos. 7,397,910, 7,555,110, 8,325,901 and 7,822,188 filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
September 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 419 REPLY to #412 MOTION to Lift Stay of Proceedings on the '970 Patent, filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-B)(McMillan, James) Modified on 9/25/2015 (nms).
September 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 418 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's 1) Reply Expert Report of Dr. David Lucantoni Regarding Dr. Eric Burger's Rebuttal Expert Report Regarding Infringement of U.S. Patent Nos.7,397,910, 7,555,110, 7822,188 and 8,325,901, and 2) Reply Expert Report of Dr. Glenn Reinman Regarding Dr. Eric Burger's Rebuttal Expert Report Regarding Infringement of U.S. Patent Nos.7,397,910, 7,555,110, 7822,188 and 8,325,901 filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
September 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 417 ORDER from Special Master Yvonne Takvorian Saville. Signed by Yvonne Takvorian Saville on 9/10/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(ksr, )
September 15, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #416 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Mark C. Scarsi, Philip T. Chen, Ashlee Lin, Dat Nguyen, Christopher Gaspar and Nathaniel Browand of MILBANK, TWEED, HADLEY & MCCLOY LLP filed by Google Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/15/2015. (nms)
September 15, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 416 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Mark C. Scarsi, Philip T. Chen, Ashlee Lin, Dat Nguyen, Christopher Gaspar and Nathaniel Browand of MILBANK, TWEED, HADLEY & MCCLOY LLP filed by Google Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/15/2015. (nms)
September 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 416 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Mark C. Scarsi, Philip T. Chen, Ashlee Lin, Dat Nguyen, Christopher Gaspar and Nathaniel Browand of Milbank, Tweed, Hadley & Mccloy LLP- filed by Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul) Modified on 9/15/2015 (nms).
September 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 415 RESPONSE to #412 MOTION to Lift Stay of Proceedings on the '970 Patent, filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 9/15/2015 (nms).
September 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 414 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Reply Expert Reports to September 18, 2015 - filed by Broadsoft Inc.. (Day, John) Modified on 9/10/2015 (nms).
September 10, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (414 in 12-cv-1701-RGA, 437 in 12-cv-1702-RGA, 393 in 12-cv-1704-RGA, 221 in 13-cv-711-RGA) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Reply Expert Reports to September 18, 2015, filed by Broadsoft Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/10/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:13-cv-00711-RGA(nms)
August 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Set Answering Brief Deadline re (412 in 12-cv-1701-RGA, 239 in 12-cv-1788-RGA, 391 in 12-cv-1704-RGA) MOTION to Lift Stay of Proceedings on the '970 Patent. Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 9/14/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
August 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Set Answering Brief Deadline re (412 in 12-cv-1701-RGA, 239 in 12-cv-1788-RGA, 391 in 12-cv-1704-RGA) MOTION to Lift Stay of Proceedings on the '970 Patent. Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 9/14/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
August 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 413 PROPOSED ORDER regarding Motion To Lift the Stay of Proceedings on the '970 Patent, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Johnson, Edmond) Modified on 8/28/2015 (nms).
August 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 412 MOTION to Lift Stay of Proceedings on the '970 Patent - filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 7.1.1. Certification, #2 Exhibits A and B)(Johnson, Edmond) Modified on 8/28/2015 (nms).
August 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 411 ORDER from Special Master Yvonne Takvorian Saville.. Signed by Yvonne Takvorian Saville on 8/17/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(ksr, )
August 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 410 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Expert Report of Dr. Eric Burger Regarding Noninfringement of U.S. Patent Nos. 7,397,910, 7,555,110, 8,325,901 and 7,822,188 and (2) Expert Report Regarding Damages Applicable to Google, Inc. filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
August 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 409 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) Callwave Communications, LLC's Rebuttal Expert Report of Dr. David Lucantoni Regarding Dr. Eric Burger's Opening Expert Report Regarding the Validity of U.S. Patent Nos. 7,397,910, 7,555,110, 7,822,188 and 8,325,910 submitted on behalf of Google Inc. and 2) Callwave Communications, LLC's Rebuttal Expert Report of Dr. David Lucantoni Regarding Opening Invalidity Expert Report of Dr. Charles A. Eldering submitted on behalf of Google Inc. filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
August 3, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (408 in 12-cv-1701-RGA, 209 in 13-cv-711-RGA, 433 in 12-cv-1702-RGA, 387 in 12-cv-1704-RGA) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Exchange Expert Reports and Complete Expert Depositions, filed by Google Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/3/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:13-cv-00711-RGA(nms)
July 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 408 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Exchange Expert Reports and Complete Expert Depositions to see Stipulation for details - filed by Google Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
July 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 407 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Callwave Communications, LLC's Third Supplemental Responses to Google Inc.'s First Individual Interrogatories Relating to the Call Processing Track (4) and Plaintiff's Supplemental Responses and Objections to Google Inc.'s First Individual Requests for Admission Relating to the Call Processing Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
July 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 406 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLCs Notice of Deposition to be taken of Alex Wiesen on July 9, 2015 filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
July 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 405 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's 1) Expert Report of Philip Green, 2) Expert Report of Dr. David Lucantoni, and 3) Expert Report of Dr. Glenn Reinman filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
July 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 404 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Thomas F. Fitzpatrick - filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Thomas F. Fitzpatrick)(Johnson, Edmond)
July 7, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 404 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Thomas F. Fitzpatrick filed by CallWave Communications LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/7/2015. (nms)
July 7, 2015 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: The motion filed at D.I. 404 has been removed from the docket per counsel's request. The a corrected motion will be re-filed. (nms)
July 7, 2015 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: The motion filed at D.I. 404 has been removed from the docket per counsel's request. The a corrected motion will be re-filed. (nms)
July 7, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #404 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Thomas F. Fitzpatrick filed by CallWave Communications LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/7/2015. (nms)
June 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 403 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master for (391 in 12-cv-1701-RGA, 307 in 12-cv-1703-RGA, 370 in 12-cv-1704-RGA, 414 in 12-cv-1702-RGA). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/29/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(nms)
June 26, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (381 in 12-cv-1704-RGA, 425 in 12-cv-1702-RGA, 402 in 12-cv-1701-RGA, 204 in 13-cv-711-RGA) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for expert reports to opening July 2, 2015; rebuttal August 3, 2015; and reply August 31, 2015, filed by Google Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/26/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:13-cv-00711-RGA(nms)
June 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 402 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for expert reports to opening - July 2, 2015; rebuttal - August 3, 2015; and reply - August 31, 2015 - filed by Google Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
June 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 401 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendant's Fifth Supplemental Invalidity Contentions and (2) Defendant Google Inc.'s Reduced Set of Prior Art in the Call Processing Track filed by Google Inc..(Blumenfeld, Jack)
June 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 400 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding entry of Rule 54(b) judgment. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
June 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 399 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Google Inc.'s Factual Disclosure filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
June 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 398 ORDER Regarding Claim Construction For Call Processing Patents (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/15/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:13-cv-00711-RGA(nms)
June 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 397 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Second Supplemental Responses to Google Inc.'s First Individual Interrogatories Relating to the Call Processing Track (5-7) filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
June 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 396 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) Callwave Communications, LLC's Amended Notice of Deposition to be taken of Margaret Johnson on June 19, 2015; and 2) Callwave Communications, LLC's Notice of Deposition to be taken of Defendant Google Inc. on June 19, 2015 filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
June 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 395 PROPOSED Order regarding Claim Construction for Call Processing Patents, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Johnson, Edmond) Modified on 6/9/2015 (nms).
June 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Set Answering Brief Deadline re #394 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b). Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 6/22/2015. (nms)
June 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Set Answering Brief Deadline re 394 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b). Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 6/22/2015. (nms)
June 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 394 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) - filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (Johnson, Edmond)
June 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 393 MEMORANDUM OPINION providing claim construction for the disputed terms found in U.S. Patent No., 7,397,910, 7,555,110, 7,636,428,7,822,188, 8,064,588, 8,325,901, and 8,351,591. Within five days the parties shall submit a proposed order consistent with this Memorandum Opinion suitable for submission to the jury. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/3/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:13-cv-00711-RGA(nms)
June 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 392 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Identification of the reduced list of Asserted Patents and Claims against Defendant Google Inc. filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
June 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 391 RULINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master Yvonne Takvorian Saville - Objections to R&R due by 6/25/2015. Signed by Yvonne Takvorian Saville, Special Master on 6/1/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(ksr, )
May 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 390 ORDER Granting #386 Stipulation of Dismissal regarding U.S. Patent No. 6,771,970, filed by CallWave Communications LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/27/2015. (nms) (Main Document 390 replaced on 5/27/2015) (nms).
May 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 389 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Fourth Supplemental Responses to Defendants' First Common Interrogatories Relating to the Call Processing Track (7) filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
May 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 388 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Supplemental Responses to Google Inc.'s First Individual Interrogatories Relating to the Call Processing Track (5) filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
May 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 387 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Supplemental Disclosure of Infringement Contentions Against Google Inc. filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
May 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 386 STIPULATION of Dismissal, by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James) Modified on 5/27/2015 (nms).
May 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 385 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Fourth Supplemental Invalidity Contentions filed by Google Inc..(Blumenfeld, Jack)
May 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 384 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Notice of Deposition to be taken of Margaret Johnson on June 3, 2015 Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30 filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
May 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 383 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Google Inc.'s Supplemental Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
May 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 382 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Google Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Callwave Communications, LLC's Third Individual Interrogatories to Google Relating to the Call Processing Track (No. 6) filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
May 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 381 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Google Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Callwave Communications, LLC's First Individual Requests for Admission to Google Relating to the Call Processing Track (Nos. 1-22) and (2) Google Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Callwave Communications, LLC's First Collective Requests for Admission to All Defendants Relating to the Call Processing Track (Nos. 1-2) filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
May 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 379 SO ORDERED re (378 in 12-cv-1701-RGA, 353 in 12-cv-1704-RGA, 301 in 12-cv-1703-RGA, 399 in 12-cv-1702-RGA, 235 in 12-cv-1788-RGA) Stipulation and Proposed Order of Non-Infringement, filed by CallWave Communications LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/4/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
May 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 378 STIPULATION and Proposed Order of Non-Infringement, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Johnson, Edmond) Modified on 5/5/2015 (nms).
April 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 380 SO ORDERED re (351 in 12-cv-1704-RGA, 182 in 13-cv-711-RGA, 395 in 12-cv-1702-RGA, 376 in 12-cv-1701-RGA) Stipulation and Order extending deadlines in the Scheduling Order (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/30/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:13-cv-00711-RGA(nms)
April 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 377 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Google Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Callwave Communications, LLC's Second Individual Interrogatories to Google Relating to The Call Processing Track (Nos. 2-5) filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
April 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 376 STIPULATION to amend the scheduling order for call processing track actions by Broadsoft Inc.. (Mayo, Andrew)
April 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 375 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendants' Third Supplemental Invalidity Contentions and (2) Google Supplemental Privilege Log filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
April 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 374 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Notice of Deposition to Matt Reilly Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30 filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
April 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 373 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Google Inc.'s First Supplemental Responses and Objections to Callwave Communications, LLC's First Interrogatories to Google Regarding the Call Processing Track (No. 1) filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
April 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 372 Redaction Version of #296 Transcript. (nms)
April 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 371 ORDER Appointing Special Master: Yvonne Takvorian Saville appointed (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/14/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA et al.(nms)
April 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 370 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Google Inc.'s First Supplemental Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's First Collective Interrogatories to the Call Processing Track Defendants (Nos. 3 and 4) filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
April 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 369 REDACTED VERSION of #359 Reply to Motion, by AT&T Mobility LLC, T-Moblie USA Inc., Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 4/14/2015 (nms).
April 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 368 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Notice of Deposition to Mayur Kamat filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
April 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 367 ORDER Granting in part MOTION to Seal Confidential Portions of Transcript of Motion to Stay (see D.I. 334 in 12-cv-1701-RGA, D.I. 279 in 12-cv-1703-RGA, D.I. 330 in 12-cv-1702-RGA) (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/14/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA(nms)
April 14, 2015 Opinion or Order REDACTION NOTICE: In accordance with section G of the Administrative Procedures Governing Filing and Service by Electronic Means, redacted versions of sealed documents shall be filed electronically within 7 days of the filing of the sealed document. The records of this case do not reflect the filing of a redacted version of DI # 359 . (nms)
April 14, 2015 Opinion or Order REDACTION NOTICE: In accordance with section G of the Administrative Procedures Governing Filing and Service by Electronic Means, redacted versions of sealed documents shall be filed electronically within 7 days of the filing of the sealed document. The records of this case do not reflect the filing of a redacted version of DI #359 . (nms)
April 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 366 Proposed Order for Motion to Seal Confidential Portions of Transcript, by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 4/14/2015 (nms).
April 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 365 ORDER REFERRING CASES to Clerk for assignment of a Special Master. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/13/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA et al.(nms)
April 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 364 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) Plaintiff's First Individual Requests for Admission to Google Inc. (1-22); and 2) Plaintiff's Third Individual Interrogatories to Google Inc. Relating to the Call Processing Track (6) filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
April 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 363 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's First Collective Requests for Admission to all Defendants Relating to the Call Processing Track (1-2) filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
April 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 362 ORAL ORDER: The moving party to the application to Seal Confidential Portions of Transcript of Motion to Stay Heard on February 10, 2015 (see 334 in 12-cv-1701-RGA, 279 in 12-cv-1703-RGA, 330 in 12-cv-1702-RGA) shall within 3 days of the date of this Order submit a revised proposed order that specifies the pages and lines of the requested redactions so that the Order will speak for itself as to what is redacted. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/8/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA(nms)
April 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 361 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Second Supplemental Invalidity Contentions filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
April 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 360 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Google Inc.'s First Individual Interrogatories to Plaintiff Callwave Communications, LLC relationg to the Call Processing Track (Nos. 1-9) and (2) Google Inc.'s First Individual Requests for Admission to Plaintiff filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
April 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 359 [SEALED] REPLY to #334 MOTION to Seal Confidential Portions of Transcript of Motion to Stay Heard on February 10, 2015, filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 4/6/2015 (nms).
April 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 358 REDACTED VERSION of #349 Response to Motion, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Johnson, Edmond) Modified on 4/2/2015 (nms).
April 2, 2015 Opinion or Order REDACTION NOTICE: In accordance with section G of the Administrative Procedures Governing Filing and Service by Electronic Means, redacted versions of sealed documents shall be filed electronically within 7 days of the filing of the sealed document. The records of this case do not reflect the filing of a redacted version of DI #349 . (nms)
April 2, 2015 Opinion or Order REDACTION NOTICE: In accordance with section G of the Administrative Procedures Governing Filing and Service by Electronic Means, redacted versions of sealed documents shall be filed electronically within 7 days of the filing of the sealed document. The records of this case do not reflect the filing of a redacted version of DI # 349 . (nms)
April 2, 2015 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: The redaction filed at D.I. 358 has been removed from the docket. Counsel shall refile this document and link it to the sealed filing it relates to. (nms)
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 357 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Google Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Callwave Communications, LLC's Fourth Requests for Production to Google Related to the Call Processing Track (Nos. 24-37) filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 356 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Second Individual Interrogatories to Google Inc. Relating to the Call Processing Track (2-5) filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
March 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 355 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Non-Party Callwave Telecom, Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Defendants' Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information, or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
March 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 354 NOTICE of Subpoenas by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 3/31/2015 (nms).
March 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 353 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Responses and Objections to Defendants' Notice of Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition to Callwave Communications, LLC Related to the Call Processing Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
March 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 352 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Callwave Communications, LLC's Notice of Deposition to James Maccoun Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30 filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
March 25, 2015 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: The Order filed at D.I. 352 has been removed as it was entered in error. (nms)
March 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 351 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel - Collins J. Seitz, Jr. by AT&T Mobility LLC (Schladweiler, Benjamin)
March 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 350 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Callwave Communications, LLC's Sealed Response To Defendants AT&T Mobility LLC, T-Mobile USA, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P., And Sprint Communications Company L.P.'s Motion To Seal Confidential Portions Of Transcript Of Motion To Stay Heard On February 10, 2015, and Exhibits A and B, by CallWave Communications LLC (Johnson, Edmond) Modified on 3/24/2015 (nms).
March 24, 2015 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: The Certificate of Service filed at D.I. 350 has been removed from the docket. Counsel shall re-file this document which shall include the appropriate caption with the party names and case number. (nms)
March 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 349 [SEALED] RESPONSE to #334 MOTION to Seal Confidential Portions of Transcript of Motion to Stay Heard on February 10, 2015, filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Johnson, Edmond) Modified on 3/23/2015 (nms).
March 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 348 REDACTED VERSION of #340 Letter, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit F, #5 Certificate of Service)(Johnson, Edmond) Modified on 3/23/2015 (nms).
March 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 347 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Objections and Responses to Defendants' Notice of Deposition of Non-Party Richard Sanders filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
March 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 346 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Megan E. Lantto - filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James)
March 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 345 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Bryana T. McGillycuddy - filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James)
March 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 344 REDACTED VERSION of #337 Letter, by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 3/19/2015 (nms). Modified on 3/19/2015 (nms).
March 19, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (226 in 12-cv-1788-RGA, 287 in 12-cv-1703-RGA, 322 in 12-cv-1704-RGA, 341 in 12-cv-1702-RGA, 345 in 12-cv-1701-RGA, 165 in 13-cv-711-RGA) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Bryana T. McGillycuddy, filed by CallWave Communications LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/19/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA et al.(nms)
March 19, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (288 in 12-cv-1703-RGA, 323 in 12-cv-1704-RGA, 346 in 12-cv-1701-RGA, 166 in 13-cv-711-RGA, 227 in 12-cv-1788-RGA, 342 in 12-cv-1702-RGA) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Megan E. Lantto filed by CallWave Communications LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/19/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA et al.(nms)
March 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 343 ORAL ORDER: The Motions for Judgment on the Pleadings of the '970 Patent (D.I. 257 and 281 in 12cv1701-RGA, 251 and 277 in 12cv1702-RGA, 213 and 237 in 12cv1703-RGA, and 234 and 262 in 12cv1704-RGA) are Dismissed with Leave To Renew upon the expiration of the Stay regarding the '970 Patent. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/18/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(nms)
March 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 342 MEMORANDUM ORDER Granting (228 in 12-cv-1701-RGA, 166 in 12-cv-1788-RGA, 207 in 12-cv-1704-RGA, 193 in 12-cv-1703-RGA, 223 in 12-cv-1702-RGA) Renewed Motion to Stay Proceedings on the '970 Patent Pending Inter Partes Review. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/18/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
March 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 341 EXHIBITS D and E to Letter dated 3/13/2014, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Johnson, Edmond) Modified on 3/13/2015 (nms).
March 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 340 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Edmond D. Johnson regarding Response to Karen Jacobs' Letter of March 11, 2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit F, #5 Certificate of Service)(Johnson, Edmond)
March 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 339 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) Objections and Responses to Defendants' Notice of Deposition of Non-Party Mark Stubbs; 2) Non-Party Ritesh Bansal's Objections and Responses to Defendants' Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information or Objects, or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action; and 3) Non-Party Mark Stubb's Objections and Responses to Defendants' Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information or Objects, or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
March 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 338 REDACTED VERSION of #334 MOTION to Seal Confidential Portions of Transcript of Motion to Stay Heard on February 10, 2015, by AT&T Mobility LLC, T-Moblie USA Inc., Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-E)(Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 3/13/2015 (nms).
March 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 337 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Karen Jacobs regarding status report. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Jacobs, Karen) Modified on 3/11/2015 (nms).
March 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 336 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) Non-Party James C. Otteson's Objections and Responses to Defendants' Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information or Objects, or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action; 2) Non-Party Michael Buday's Objections and Responses to Defendants' Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information or Objects, or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action; 3) Non-Party David Weiss's Objections and Responses to Defendants' Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information or Objects, or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action; 4) Objections and Responses to Defendants' Notice of Deposition of Non-Party David Weiss; 5) Non-Party Jeffrey Calvins's Objections and Responses to Defendants' Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information or Objects, or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action; 6) Objections and Responses to Defendants' Notice of Deposition of Non-Party Jeffrey Cavins; and 7) Non-Party David Giannini's Objections and Responses to Defendants' Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information or Objects, or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action. filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
March 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 335 NOTICE of Subpoena to CallWave Telecom, Inc. by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 3/6/2015 (nms).
March 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Set Answering Brief Deadline re (334 in 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 279 in 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 330 in 1:12-cv-01702-RGA) MOTION to Seal Confidential Portions of Transcript of Motion to Stay Heard on February 10, 2015. Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 3/23/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA(nms)
March 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 334 [SEALED] MOTION to Seal Confidential Portions of Transcript of Motion to Stay Heard on February 10, 2015 - filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, T-Moblie USA Inc., Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 3/6/2015 (nms).
March 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 333 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Stephen J. Kraftschik, Esq. regarding AT&T, Sprint Spectrum, Sprint Communications, T-Mobile USA and Verizon Joinder to Google's Request for Oral Argument. (Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 3/4/2015 (nms).
March 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 332 ORDER regarding CallWave's request for AT&T's indemnification documents that were withheld for privilege. CallWave's request for these documents is DENIED. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/4/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA(nms)
March 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 331 NOTICE of Subpoena on Cisco Systems, Inc. by Google Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Saindon, Paul)
March 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 330 REDACTED VERSION of #320 Letter, by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-C)(Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 3/3/2015 (nms). Modified on 3/4/2015 (nms).
March 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 329 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding Request for Oral Argument. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
March 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 328 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Edmond D. Johnson regarding response to Karen Jacobs' February 24, 2015 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-C, #2 Exhibit D, #3 Exhibit E)(McMillan, James) Modified on 3/3/2015 (nms).
February 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 327 REPLY BRIEF re #281 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings for Invalidation of the Asserted Claims of the '970 Patent, filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 3/3/2015 (nms).
February 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 326 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Benjamin J. Schladweiler regarding in camera documents - re #301 Letter, #297 Letter. (Schladweiler, Benjamin)
February 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 325 NOTICE of SERVICE of (i) Answers to Plaintiff's First Interrogatories to AT&T Mobility, LLC Regarding the '970 Track (1), and (ii) Responses of AT&T Mobility, LLC to Plaintiff's Second Requests for Production to AT&T Mobility, LLC Related to the '970 Track (2-11) by AT&T Mobility LLC (Schladweiler, Benjamin)
February 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 324 NOTICE of Amended Subpoenas to Ritesh Bansal, Gerald Hosier, Robert Pedersen and Mark Stubbs by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-5)(Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 3/3/2015 (nms).
February 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 323 Official Transcript of Discovery Dispute held on 02-25-15 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leonard A. Dibbs. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/19/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/30/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/27/2015. (lad)
February 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 322 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Fourth Requests for Production to Google Inc. Related to the Call Processing Track (24-37) filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
February 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Andrews - Discovery Conference was held on 2/25/2015. (Court Reporter Leonard Dibbs.) Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA(nms)
February 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 321 NOTICE of Subpoena by Google Inc. (Saindon, Paul)
February 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 320 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Karen Jacobs regarding Status Report. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-C)(Jacobs, Karen)
February 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 319 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Responses and Objections to Google's First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff Callwave Communications, LLC Relating to the '970 Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
February 23, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (318 in 12-cv-01701-RGA, 267 in 12-cv-01703-RGA, 215 in 12-cv-01788-RGA, 293 in 12-cv-01704-RGA, 313 in 12-cv-01702-RGA) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME regarding Scheduling Order for the '970 Track to (see Stipulation), filed by Google Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/23/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
February 23, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (318 in 12-cv-01701-RGA, 267 in 12-cv-01703-RGA, 215 in 12-cv-01788-RGA, 293 in 12-cv-01704-RGA, 313 in 12-cv-01702-RGA) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME regarding Scheduling Order for the '970 Track to (see Stipulation), filed by Google Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/23/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
February 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 318 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME regarding Scheduling Order for the '970 Track to (see Stipulation) - filed by Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul)
February 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 317 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Google Inc.'s Responses and Objections to CallWave Communications, LLC's Third Requests for Production to Google Related to the Call Processing Track (20-23) filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
February 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 316 NOTICE of Subpoenas to Ritesh Bansal, Michael Buday, Jeffrey Cavins, David Giannini, Gerald Hosier, James Otteson, Robert Pedersen, Mark Stubbs and David Weiss, by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-12)(Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 2/23/2015 (nms).
February 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 315 REDACTED VERSION of #301 Letter, by AT&T Mobility LLC, T-Moblie USA Inc., Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits G-Q)(Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 2/20/2015 (nms).
February 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 314 REDACTED VERSION of #297 Letter by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit F)(Johnson, Edmond)
February 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 313 ORDER ruling on one of the pending discovery disputes (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/19/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA(nms)
February 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 312 ORAL ORDER: Due to inclement weather the Discovery Conference set for 2/17/2015, was not able to proceed. The Court will now reschedule the Discovery Conference for 2/25/2015, at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/19/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA(nms)
February 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 311 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Richard Sanders on April 20, 2015 filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
February 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 310 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Callwave Communications, LLC on April 9, 2015 filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Saindon, Paul)
February 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 309 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Callwave Communications, LLC on April 9, 2015 filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Saindon, Paul)
February 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 308 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Richard Sanders on March 16, 2015 filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
February 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 307 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Callwave Communications, LLC on March 20, 2015 filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Saindon, Paul)
February 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 306 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Karen Jacobs regarding IPR Statistics. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-C)(Jacobs, Karen)
February 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 305 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Edmond D. Johnson regarding Court's Request on February 10, 2015 re IPR Statistics. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Johnson, Edmond)
February 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 304 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #281 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings for Invalidation of the Asserted Claims of the '970 Patent filed by CallWave Communications LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 2/27/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Johnson, Edmond)
February 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 303 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Edmond D. Johnson, Esq. regarding Request for Oral Argument. (Johnson, Edmond) Modified on 2/18/2015 (nms).
February 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 302 REDACTED VERSION of #293 Letter, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-I)(Johnson, Edmond) Modified on 2/18/2015 (nms).
February 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 301 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Karen Jacobs, Benjamin J. Schladweiler and Ryan P. Newell regarding response to CallWave's February 12, 2015 Letter Brief - re (251 in 1:12-cv-01703-RGA) Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit G-Q)(Jacobs, Karen)
February 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 300 REPLY BRIEF re #257 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings for Invalidation of the Asserted Claims of the '970 Patent filed by Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul)
February 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 299 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Callwave's Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews filed under seal, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Johnson, Edmond) Modified on 2/12/2015 (nms).
February 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 298 EXHIBITS to #297 Letter, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Johnson, Edmond) Modified on 2/12/2015 (nms).
February 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 297 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Edmond D. Johnson regarding February 17, 2015 discovery conference. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit F)(Johnson, Edmond) Modified on 2/12/2015 (nms).
February 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines re (372 in 1:12-cv-01701-RGA) Redacted Transcript. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/11/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA et al.(rwc)
February 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 296 SEALED Official Transcript of Motion to Stay held on 02-10-15 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leonard A. Dibbs. (lad) Modified on 4/15/2015 (nms).
February 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Andrews - Oral Argument held on 2/10/2015. (Court Reporter Leonard Dibbs.) Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(ksr, )
February 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 295 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Garreth A. Sarosi - filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Schladweiler, Benjamin)
February 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 294 EXHIBIT to #293 Letter, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Johnson, Edmond) Modified on 2/9/2015 (nms).
February 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 293 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Edmond D. Johnson regarding response to the Defendants' February 6, 2015 Letter regarding response to the Court's January 28, 2015 Oral Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibits D through I, #5 Certificate of Service)(Johnson, Edmond)
February 9, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #295 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Garreth A. Sarosi filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/9/2015. (nms)
February 9, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 295 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Garreth A. Sarosi filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/9/2015. (nms)
February 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Garreth A. Sarosi for AT&T Mobility LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (dmp, )
February 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 292 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Karen Jacobs regarding response to the Courts January 28, 2015 Oral Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-C)(Jacobs, Karen)
February 6, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (245 in 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 271 in 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 291 in 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 286 in 1:12-cv-01702-RGA) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Anup K. Misra and Anthony DeMarco Pesce of WINSTON & STRAWN LLP filed by Google Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/6/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(nms)
February 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 291 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Anup K. Misra and Anthony DeMarco Pesce of WINSTON & STRAWN LLP - filed by Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul)
February 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 290 ORAL ORDER: The parties have advised that a discovery dispute has arisen requiring judicial attention. The Court will hold a Discovery conference on 2/17/2015, at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews, to take up this issue. In preparation for this conference the parties shall follow the Discovery Matters and Disputes procedure as set forth in the Scheduling Order. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/5/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA(nms)
February 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 289 NOTICE of Firm Name Change by AT&T Mobility LLC (Schladweiler, Benjamin)
February 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 288 REDACTED VERSION of #274 Reply Brief, by AT & T Inc., AT & T Mobility LLC, Blackberry Corporation, Blackberry Limited, AT&T Inc., AT&T Mobility LLC, Google Inc., T-Moblie USA Inc., Cellco Partnership, Verizon Services Corp., Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 5-7)(Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 2/3/2015 (nms).
February 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 287 NOTICE of SERVICE of (i) Responses of AT&T Mobility LLC to Plaintiff's Second Collective Requests for Production to All Defendants (No. 27), and (ii) Responses of AT&T Mobility LLC to Plaintiff's First Requests for Production to AT&T (No. 1) by AT&T Mobility LLC (Schladweiler, Benjamin)
February 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 286 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #257 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings for Invalidation of the Asserted Claims of the '970 Patent filed by CallWave Communications LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 2/12/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(McMillan, James)
February 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 285 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Google Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Callwave Communications, LLC's Second Collective Requests for Production to All Defendants Related to the Call Processing Track (No. 27) filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
February 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 284 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Googles Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Callwave Communications, LLC's Second Collective Requests for Production to All Defendants Related to the '970 Track (No. 27) filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
February 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 283 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Google Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Callwave Communications, LLC's Second Requests for Production to Google Inc. Related to the '970 Track (Nos. 17) filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
January 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 282 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #281 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings for Invalidation of the Asserted Claims of the '970 Patent filed by AT&T Mobility LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 2/17/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-B)(Kraftschik, Stephen)
January 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 281 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings for Invalidation of the Asserted Claims of the '970 Patent - filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, T-Moblie USA Inc., Verizon Services Corp., Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Kraftschik, Stephen)
January 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 280 Request for International Judicial Assistance, Pursuant to the Hague Convention on the Taking of Evidence Abroad in Civil or Commercial Matters, to Obtain Evidence From Locationet Systems Ltd.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/28/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
January 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 279 Request for International Judicial Assistance, Pursuant to the Hague Convention on the Taking of Evidence Abroad in Civil or Commercial Matters, to Obtain Evidence From MPD Technologies Ltd.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/28/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
January 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 278 ORAL ORDER: The Motion to Issue Letters of Request for International Judicial Assistance Pursuant to the Hague Evidence Convention is Granted (see D.I. 211 in 12-cv-01704-RGA, D.I. 196 in 12-cv-01703-RGA, D.I. 169 in 12-cv-01788-RGA, D.I. 232 in 12-cv-01701-RGA, D.I. 227 in 12-cv-01702-RGA). Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/28/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
January 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 277 ORAL ORDER: The Court will hear oral argument on the Renewed Motion to Stay Proceedings on the '970 Patent Pending Inter Partes Review by the Patent Trial and Appeal Board (see D.I. 228 in 12-cv-01701-RGA, D.I. 166 in 12-cv-01788-RGA, D.I. 207 in 12-cv-01704-RGA, D.I. 193 in 12-cv-01703-RGA, D.I. 223 in 12-cv-01702-RGA) on 2/10/2015, at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/28/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
January 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 276 ORAL ORDER: By no later than Feb. 6, 2015, all moving parties for the stay of the '970 track are requested to advise, if the stay were to be granted, whether the party would agree to be bound just as if it were the petitioner for the IPR, which, to the Court's understanding, would mean that the party could not raise any invalidity ground that was, or reasonably could have been, raised in the IPR, that is, section 102 & 103 arguments based on prior art consisting of patents or printed publications. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/28/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
January 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 275 Official Transcript of Discovery Dispute held on 01-23-15 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leonard A. Dibbs. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/17/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/27/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/27/2015. (lad)
January 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 274 [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re #232 MOTION to Issue Letters of Request for International Judicial Assistance Pursuant to the Hague Evidence Convention filed by AT&T Inc., AT&T Mobility LLC, Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 5-7)(Kraftschik, Stephen)
January 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 273 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Google Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Callwave Communications, LLC's Second Requests for Production Related to the Call Processing Track (12-19) filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
January 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 272 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Plaintiff's Second Individual Interrogatories to AT&T Mobility, LLC Relating to the '970 Track (2-3) and 2) Plaintiff's Second Individual Requests for Production to AT&T Mobility, LLC Related to the'970 Track (2-11) filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
January 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 271 REDACTED VERSION of #259 Answering Brief in Opposition, by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James) Modified on 1/26/2015 (nms).
January 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 270 REDACTED VERSION of #252 Exhibit A in support of Declaration, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(McMillan, James) Modified on 1/23/2015 (nms).
January 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 269 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Google Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff Callwave Communications, LLC Relating to the '970 Track filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
January 23, 2015 Opinion or Order REDACTION NOTICE: In accordance with section G of the Administrative Procedures Governing Filing and Service by Electronic Means, redacted versions of sealed documents shall be filed electronically within 7 days of the filing of the sealed document. The records of this case do not reflect the filing of a redacted version of DI #252 . (nms)
January 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Andrews - Discovery Conference held on 1/23/2015. (Court Reporter Leonard Dibbs.) Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(ksr, )
January 23, 2015 Opinion or Order REDACTION NOTICE: In accordance with section G of the Administrative Procedures Governing Filing and Service by Electronic Means, redacted versions of sealed documents shall be filed electronically within 7 days of the filing of the sealed document. The records of this case do not reflect the filing of a redacted version of DI # 252 . (nms)
January 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 268 NOTICE of SERVICE of Defendant AT&T Mobility LLC's Objections to Plaintiff's Notice of Deposition Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) by AT&T Mobility LLC (Schladweiler, Benjamin)
January 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 267 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Edmond D. Johnson regarding fact discovery deadline. (Attachments: #1 Exhbits A and B)(Johnson, Edmond)
January 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 266 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Karen Jacobs regarding Defendants seek a modest two month extension of the February 25, 2015 fact discovery deadline. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Jacobs, Karen) (Main Document 266 replaced on 1/21/2015) (nms).
January 21, 2015 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: The main document pdf for the letter filed on 1/21/2015, has been swapped out with an amended version. The new version removes any reference to C.A. 13-711-RGA. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
January 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 265 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Google's Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's Rule 30(b)(6) Notice of Deposition and Topics Related to the '970 Track and (2) Google's Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's Rule 30(b)(6) Notice of Deposition and Topics Related to the Call Processing Track filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
January 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 264 REQUEST for Oral Argument by Blackberry Corporation, Blackberry Limited, AT&T Mobility LLC, T-Moblie USA Inc., Verizon Services Corp., Google Inc., Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P. regarding Renewed Motion to Stay Proceedings on the '970 Patent Pending Inter Partes Review by the Patent Trial and Appeal Board. (Dellinger, Megan) Modified on 1/21/2015 (nms).
January 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 263 DECLARATION re #262 Reply Brief, by AT & T Inc., AT & T Mobility LLC, Blackberry Corporation, Blackberry Limited, AT&T Mobility LLC, Google Inc., T-Moblie USA Inc., Cellco Partnership, Verizon Services Corp., Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits D and E)(Dellinger, Megan) Modified on 1/21/2015 (nms).
January 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 262 REPLY BRIEF re #228 Renewed Motion to Stay Proceedings on the '970 Patent Pending Inter Partes Review by the Patent Trial and Appeal Board filed by Google Inc.. (Dellinger, Megan)
January 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 261 REDACTED VERSION of #250 Sealed Answering Brief in Opposition, by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James) Modified on 1/20/2015 (nms).
January 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 260 EXHIBIT A re #259 Answering Brief in Opposition, by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James) Modified on 1/20/2015 (nms).
January 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 259 [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #232 MOTION to Issue Letters of Request for International Judicial Assistance Pursuant to the Hague Evidence Convention filed by CallWave Communications LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 1/26/2015. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(McMillan, James)
January 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 258 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #257 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings for Invalidation of the Asserted Claims of the '970 Patent,filed by Google Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 2/2/2015. (Saindon, Paul) Modified on 1/16/2015 (nms).
January 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 257 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings for Invalidation of the Asserted Claims of the '970 Patent - filed by Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul) Modified on 1/16/2015 (nms).
January 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 256 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Third Requests for Production to Google Inc. Related to the Call Processing Track (20-23) filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
January 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 255 ORAL ORDER: The parties have advised that a discovery dispute has arisen requiring judicial attention. The Court will hold a Discovery conference on 1/23/2015, at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews, to take up this issue. In preparation for this conference the parties shall follow the Discovery Matters and Disputes procedure as set forth in the Scheduling Order. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/14/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
January 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 254 Official Transcript of Markman Hearing held on 01-17-15 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leonard A. Dibbs. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/4/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/17/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/14/2015. (lad)
January 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 253 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Karen Jacobs regarding Construction of "switched network." (Jacobs, Karen) Modified on 1/15/2015 (nms).
January 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 252 [SEALED] EXHIBIT A re #251 Declaration, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(McMillan, James) Modified on 1/13/2015 (nms).
January 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 251 DECLARATION of Leah McCoy re #250 Answering Brief in Opposition, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit C)(McMillan, James) Modified on 1/13/2015 (nms).
January 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 250 [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #228 Renewed Motion to Stay Proceedings on the '970 Patent Pending Inter Partes Review by the Patent Trial and Appeal Board filed by CallWave Communications LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 1/23/2015. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(McMillan, James)
January 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 249 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Supplemental Invalidity Contentions filed by Broadsoft Inc..(Mayo, Andrew)
January 13, 2015 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: Exhibit A has been added to D.I. #247 . The exhibit was inadvertently omitted from the initial filing. (nms)
January 13, 2015 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: Exhibit A has been added to D.I. 247 . The exhibit was inadvertently omitted from the initial filing. (nms)
January 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 248 Letter to Judge Andrews from James G. McMillan, III regarding response to the Court's oral order of January 8 re: construction of "switched network". (McMillan, James)
January 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 247 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Karen Jacobs regarding response to the Court's oral order of January 8 (D.I. 242 ) re: construction of "switched network." (Jacobs, Karen) Modified on 1/13/2015 (nms). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/13/2015: #1 Exhibit A) (nms).
January 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 246 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Karen Jacobs regarding response to CallWave's letter submitted on January 9, 2015 re: outcall. (Jacobs, Karen) Modified on 1/13/2015 (nms).
January 12, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (238 in 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 244 in 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 205 in 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 175 in 1:12-cv-01788-RGA, 221 in 1:12-cv-01704-RGA) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to file answering brief in opposition to Renewed Motion to Stay Proceedings on the '970 Patent to January 13, 2015, filed by CallWave Communications LLC (Reset Briefing Schedule: Answering Brief due 1/13/2015). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/12/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
January 12, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (238 in 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 244 in 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 205 in 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 175 in 1:12-cv-01788-RGA, 221 in 1:12-cv-01704-RGA) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to file answering brief in opposition to Renewed Motion to Stay Proceedings on the '970 Patent to January 13, 2015, filed by CallWave Communications LLC (Reset Briefing Schedule: Answering Brief due 1/13/2015). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/12/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
January 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 245 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding Callwave's Modified Proposal. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
January 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 244 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Callwave to file its answering brief in opposition to Defendants' Renewed Motion to Stay Proceedings on the '970 Patent to January 13, 2015 - filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (Johnson, Edmond)
January 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 243 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Edmond D. Johnson regarding Callwave's response to a request for citations made during the claim construction hearing on January 7, 2015. (Johnson, Edmond)
January 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 242 ORAL ORDER: The parties are ordered to submit letters to the Court by the close of business on Monday, January 12, 2015, explaining: (1) whether the switched network in claims 10 and 16 of the 428 patent should have an antecedent basis, and if so, what that antecedent basis is; and (2) how the term switched network in claims 10 and 16 of the 428 patent is different from the term network used in the same claims. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/8/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:13-cv-00711-RGA(nms)
January 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Andrews - Markman Hearing held on 1/7/2015. (Court Reporter Leonard Dibbs.) Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA et al.(ksr, )
January 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 241 NOTICE of Subpoenas by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-7)(Kraftschik, Stephen)
January 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 240 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Notice of Deposition to Defendant AT&T Mobility, LLC Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) for the '970 Track on January 26, 2015 filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
January 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 239 NOTICE of Subpoena upon Ericsson, Inc. by AT&T Mobility LLC(Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Schladweiler, Benjamin) Modified on 1/7/2015 (nms).
January 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 238 REDACTED VERSION of #232 MOTION to Issue Letters of Request for International Judicial Assistance Pursuant to the Hague Evidence Convention, by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-4)(Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 1/6/2015 (nms).
January 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ORAL ORDER: Due to a scheduling conflict the Markman Hearing set for 1/7/2015, will now commence at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/6/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA et al.(nms)
January 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 236 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Notice of Deposition to Defendant Google Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) for the Call Processing Track on January 21, 2015 filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
January 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 235 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Notice of Deposition to Defendant Google Inc. for the '970 Track on January 22, 2015 filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
January 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 234 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Second Requests for Production to Google Inc. Related to the '970 Track (17) filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
January 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 233 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's First Requests for Production to AT&T Related to the '970 Track (1) filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
December 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Set Answering Brief Deadline re (211 in 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 196 in 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 169 in 1:12-cv-01788-RGA, 232 in 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 227 in 1:12-cv-01702-RGA) MOTION to Issue Letters of Request for International Judicial Assistance Pursuant to the Hague Evidence Convention. Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 1/16/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
December 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 232 [SEALED] MOTION to Issue Letters of Request for International Judicial Assistance Pursuant to the Hague Evidence Convention - filed by AT & T Mobility LLC, Blackberry Corporation, Blackberry Limited, Google Inc., T-Moblie USA Inc., Cellco Partnership, Verizon Services Corp., Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-4)(Kraftschik, Stephen)
December 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 231 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Second Requests for Production to Google Inc. Related to the Call Processing Track (12-19) filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
December 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 230 DECLARATION of Stephen J. Kraftschik re #228 Renewed Motion to Stay Proceedings on the '970 Patent Pending Inter Partes Review by the Patent Trial and Appeal Board, by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-C)(Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 1/4/2015 (nms).
December 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 229 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #228 Renewed Motion to Stay Proceedings on the '970 Patent Pending Inter Partes Review by the Patent Trial and Appeal Board, filed by AT&T Inc., AT&T Mobility LLC, Google Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 1/9/2015. (Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 1/4/2015 (nms).
December 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 228 Renewed Motion to Stay Proceedings on the '970 Patent Pending Inter Partes Review by the Patent Trial and Appeal Board - filed by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 1/4/2015 (nms).
December 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ORDER Regarding Claim Construction For US Patents 6,771,970 and 7,907,933. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/23/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
December 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 226 PROPOSED Claim Construction Order, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Appendix B)(Johnson, Edmond) Modified on 12/23/2014 (nms).
December 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 225 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Google's Responses to Plaintiff's Second Interrogatories to Google Relating to the '970 Track (Nos. 2-5) and (2) Google's Responses and Objections to Callwave Communications, LLC's First Requests for Production Related to the '970 Track (Nos. 1-16) filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
December 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 224 MEMORANDUM OPINION providing claim construction for the disputed terms. Within five days the parties shall submit a proposed order consistent with this Memorandum Opinion suitable for submission to the jury. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/17/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
December 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 223 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Google's Responses to Plaintiff's Second Collective Interrogatories to the Call Processing Track Defendants (No. 8) filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
December 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 222 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Google's Responses to Plaintiff's Second Collective Interrogatories to the '933 Track Defendants (No. 8) and (2) Google's Responses to Plaintiff's Second Collective Interrogatories to the '970 Track Defendants (No. 8) filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
December 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 221 NOTICE of SERVICE of Responses of AT&T Mobility LLC to Plaintiff's Second Collective Interrogatories to '970 Track Defendants (8) by AT&T Mobility LLC (Schladweiler, Benjamin)
December 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 220 NOTICE of SERVICE of Responses of AT&T Mobility LLC to Plaintiff's Second Collective Interrogatories to '933 Track Defendants (8) by AT&T Mobility LLC (Schladweiler, Benjamin)
December 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER Denying CallWave's request for documents (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/15/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
December 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 218 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove James F. Hurst as co-counsel.. (Saindon, Paul)
December 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 217 Joint Appendix re #216 Joint Claim Construction Brief, by Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-2, #2 Exhibits 3-4, #3 Exhibits 5-7)(Saindon, Paul) Modified on 12/11/2014 (nms).
December 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 216 Joint Claim Construction Brief (Call Processing), filed by Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul) Modified on 12/11/2014 (nms).
December 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney LeinWeih A. Tseng for CallWave Communications LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA et al.(dmp, )
December 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 215 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Sur-Reply Claim Construction Brief Relating to the Call Processing Patents filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
December 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 214 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney L. Andrew Tseng - filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James)
December 3, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (210 in 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 195 in 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 214 in 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 184 in 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 158 in 1:12-cv-01788-RGA, 115 in 1:13-cv-00711-RGA) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney L. Andrew Tseng filed by CallWave Communications LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/3/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA et al.(nms)
November 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 213 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Third Supplemental Responses to Defendants' First Common Interrogatories Relating to the Call Processing Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
November 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 212 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Third Supplemental Responses to Defendants' First Set of Common Interrogatories Relating to the '970 Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
November 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 211 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Fourth Supplemental Responses to Defendants' First Set of Common Interrogatories Relating to the '933 Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
November 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 210 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Benjamin J. Schladweiler regarding in camera documents. (Schladweiler, Benjamin)
November 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER Granting Plaintiff Callwave Communications, LLC's Request To Allow An Exception To The Agreed Protective Order. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/19/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA(nms)
November 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 208 PROPOSED Order Granting Plaintiff Callwave Communications, LLCs Request to Allow an Exception to the Agreed Protective Order, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Johnson, Edmond) Modified on 11/19/2014 (nms).
November 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 207 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) Callwave Communications, LLC's Second Interrogatories to Google, Inc. relating to the '970 Track (2-5) and 2) Callwave Communications, LLC's First Requests for Production to Google, Inc. related to the '970 Track (1-14) filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
November 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 206 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Responsive Claim Construction Brief Relating to the Call Processing Patents filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
November 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 205 Official Transcript of Teleconference held on 11-14-14 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter/Transcriber Taneha Carroll. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/8/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/18/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/16/2015. (lad)
November 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORAL ORDER: The Court will hold a Telephone Conference today, 11/14/2014, at 3:00 PM before Judge Richard G. Andrews to take up the issues raised in the letters filed at D.I. 190 in 12-cv-1702-RGA, D.I. 169 in 12-cv-1703-RGA, D.I. 179 in 12-cv-1704-RGA, D.I.192 in 12-cv-1701-RGA, D.I. 170 in 12-cv-1703-RGA, D.I. 192 in 12-cv-1702-RGA, D.I. 194 in 12-cv-1701-RGA. The parties shall mutually coordinate the call to the Court. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/14/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(nms)
November 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 203 REDACTED VERSION of #194 Letter, by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 11/13/2014 (nms).
November 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 202 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Second Collective Interrogatories to Call Processing Track Defendants (8) filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
November 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 201 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Second Collective Interrogatories to '970 Track Defendants (8) filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
November 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 200 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Second Collective Interrogatories to '933 Track Defendants (8) filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
November 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 199 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Third Supplemental Responses to Defendants' First Set of Common Interrogatories Relating to the '933 Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
November 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 198 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Second Supplemental Responses to Defendants' First Set of Common Interrogatories Relating to the '970 Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
November 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 197 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Second Supplemental Responses to Defendants' First Set of Common Interrogatories Relating to the Call Processing Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
November 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 196 Official Transcript of Discovery Dispute held on 10-30-14 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leonard A. Dibbs. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/4/2015. (lad)
November 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 195 Official Transcript of Markman Hearing held on 10-29-14 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leonard A. Dibbs. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/4/2015. (lad)
November 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 194 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Stephen J. Kraftschik regarding request for an exception to the agreed protective order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kraftschik, Stephen)
November 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER Granting in part and Denying in Part (D.I. 108 in 12-cv-01702-RGA, D.I. 107 in 12-cv-01701-RGA, D.I. 101 in 12-cv-01704-RGA) MOTION to Amend Complaint (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/5/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(nms)
November 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 192 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from James G. McMillan, III regarding request for an exception to the agreed protective order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(McMillan, James)
November 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORAL ORDER: The teleconference set for 11/13/14 at 9:00 AM Eastern Time with Judge Thynge is cancelled and will be rescheduled at a later date. Ordered by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 11/4/14. (cak)
October 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 190 REDACTED VERSION of #182 Appendix, by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 10/31/2014 (nms).
October 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 189 REDACTED VERSION of #181 Letter, by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 10/31/2014 (nms).
October 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 188 REDACTED VERSION of #187 Letter, by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 10/31/2014 (nms).
October 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Andrews - Discovery Conference held on 10/30/2014. (Court Reporter Leonard Dibbs.) Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA et al.(ksr, )
October 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Andrews - Markman Hearing held on 10/29/2014. (Court Reporter Leonard Dibbs.) Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA et al.(ksr, )
October 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 187 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Karen Jacobs regarding response to CallWave's opening discovery dispute letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A & B)(Jacobs, Karen)
October 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 186 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Paul Saindon regarding response to CallWave's motion to compel. (Saindon, Paul)
October 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 185 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Edmond D. Johnson regarding Discovery Dispute. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Johnson, Edmond)
October 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 184 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Edmond D. Johnson regarding Discovery Dispute. (Johnson, Edmond)
October 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 183 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Edmond D. Johnson regarding Discovery Dispute. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Johnson, Edmond)
October 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 182 [SEALED] APPENDIX re (103 in 1:13-cv-00711-RGA, 179 in 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 142 in 1:12-cv-01788-RGA, 181 in 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 159 in 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 169 in 1:12-cv-01704-RGA) Letter by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-18)(Jacobs, Karen)
October 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 181 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Karen Jacobs regarding discovery dispute. (Jacobs, Karen)
October 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 180 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Paul Saindon regarding discovery dispute. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 2)(Saindon, Paul)
October 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 179 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Edmond D. Johnson regarding Discovery Disputes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Johnson, Edmond) Modified on 10/28/2014 (nms).
October 27, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (178 in 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 166 in 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 156 in 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 176 in 1:12-cv-01702-RGA) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney George C. Lombardi filed by Google Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/27/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(nms)
October 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 178 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney George C. Lombardi - filed by Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul)
October 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORAL ORDER: The discovery conference set by the Oral Order entered on 10/14/2014, (see 169 in 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 169 in 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 135 in 1:12-cv-01788-RGA, 135 in 1:12-cv-01788-RGA, 157 in 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 157 in 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 97 in 1:13-cv-00711-RGA, 97 in 1:13-cv-00711-RGA) will now commence at 8:30 a.m. in Courtroom 6A. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/24/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA et al.(nms)
October 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORAL ORDER: The parties have advised that the Google Defendant has a discovery dispute requiring judicial attention. The Court will hold a Discovery conference on 10/30/2014, at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews, to take up this issue. In preparation for this conference the parties shall follow the Discovery Matters and Disputes procedure as set forth in the Scheduling Order. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/24/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(nms)
October 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 175 Joint Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Paul Saindon on behalf of the parties regarding revised set of joint claim construction charts. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Saindon, Paul) Modified on 10/24/2014 (nms).
October 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Charles F. Koch for CallWave Communications LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00711-RGA et al.(els)
October 21, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (172 in 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 162 in 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 152 in 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 174 in 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 138 in 1:12-cv-01788-RGA) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Charles F. Koch filed by CallWave Communications LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/21/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
October 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 174 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Charles F. Koch - filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (Johnson, Edmond)
October 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 173 NOTICE of SERVICE of (i) AT&T Mobility's First Amended Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Fed R. Civ. P. 26, and (ii) First Amended Responses of AT&T Mobility LLC to Plaintiff's First Collective Interrogatories to '933 Track Defendants (1-7) by AT&T Mobility LLC (Schladweiler, Benjamin)
October 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 172 NOTICE Of Service of Callwave Communications, Llcs Responses to Defendant At&t Mobility, LLCs First Set of Requests for Production to Plaintiff Relating to the 970 Track, filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/16/2014 (nms).
October 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 171 Joint Appendeix of CLAIM Construction Charts, by Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Tabs A-L,Part1, #2 Tabs A-L,Part2, #3 Tabs A-L,Part3)(Saindon, Paul) Modified on 10/15/2014 (nms).
October 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 170 APPENDIX re (D.I. 168 in 12-cv-01702-RGA, D.I. 134 in 12-cv-01788-RGA, D.I. 156 in 12-cv-01704-RGA, D.I. 168 in 12-cv-01701-RGA, D.I. 147 in 12-cv-01703-RGA) Joint Claim Construction Brief, by AT & T Mobility LLC, Blackberry Corporation, Blackberry Limited, AT&T Mobility LLC, Google Inc., T-Moblie USA Inc., Cellco Partnership, Verizon Services Corp., Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-5, Part1, #2 Exhibits 1-5, Part2, #3 Exhibits 6-7)(Saindon, Paul) Modified on 10/15/2014 (nms).
October 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORAL ORDER: The parties have advised that a discovery dispute has arisen requiring judicial attention. The Court will hold a Discovery conference on 10/30/2014, at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews, to take up this issue. In preparation for this conference the parties shall follow the Discovery Matters and Disputes procedure as set forth in the Scheduling Order. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/14/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA, 1:13-cv-00711-RGA(ksr, )
October 14, 2014 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: The exhibits and two declarations attached to the Joint Claim Construction Brief filed on 10/9/2014, have been removed from that filing. Counsel shall refile these documents in a Joint Appendix and link it back to the Joint Brief it is in support of. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
October 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 168 Joint Claim Construction Brief, filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul) Modified on 10/14/2014 (nms). Modified on 10/14/2014 (nms).
October 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 167 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Callwave Communications, LLC's Initial Proposed Claim Constructions for the Call Processing Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
October 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 166 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Initial Proposed Claim Constructions for the Call Processing Track filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
October 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 165 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Peter Lambrianakos as co-counsel. Reason for request: no longer at Winston & Strawn LLP. (Saindon, Paul)
October 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 164 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Sur-Reply Claim Construction Brief Relating to the '933 and '970 Patents filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
September 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 163 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Supplemental Responses to Defendants' First Common Set of Interrogatories Relating to the '970 Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
September 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 162 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Second Supplemental Responses to Defendants' First Set of Common Interrogatories Relating to the '933 Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
September 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 161 REDACTED VERSION of #157 Letter, by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits E-H)(Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 9/23/2014 (nms).
September 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 160 Official Transcript of Discovery Dispute held on 09-16-14 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leonard A. Dibbs. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/9/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/20/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/17/2014. (lad)
September 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 159 Official Transcript of Motion to Stay held on 09-16-14 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leonard A. Dibbs. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/9/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/20/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/17/2014. (lad)
September 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORAL ORDER: The Motion to Stay Proceedings (D.I. #104 in No. 12-1701; D.I. #103 in No. 12-1702; D.I. #92 in No. 12-1703; D.I. #96 in No. 12-1704; and D.I. #86 in No. 12-1788) is DENIED for the reasons stated in open court. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/16/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(ksr, )
September 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Andrews - Discovery Conference held on 9/16/2014. (Court Reporter Leonard Dibbs.) Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA(ksr, )
September 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Andrews - Oral Argument held on 9/16/2014. (Court Reporter Leonard Dibbs.) Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(ksr, )
September 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 157 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Karen Jacobs regarding Discovery disputes - re (134 in 1:12-cv-01703-RGA) Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E through H)(Jacobs, Karen)
September 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 156 NOTICE of SERVICE of Defendant AT&T Mobility LLC's First Set of Requests for Production to Plaintiff relating to the '970 Track by AT&T Mobility LLC (Schladweiler, Benjamin)
September 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 155 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Edmond D. Johnson regarding Discovery Dispute. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit D, #3 Certificate of Service)(Johnson, Edmond)
September 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORAL ORDER: The parties have advised that discovery disputes have arisen requiring judicial attention. The Court will hold a Discovery Hearing on 9/16/2014, at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews, to take up this issue. In preparation for this conference the parties shall follow the Discovery Matters and Disputes procedure as set forth in the Scheduling Order. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/10/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA et al.(nms)
September 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 153 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Preliminary List of Claim Terms that Require Construction for the Call Processing Track filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
September 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 152 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's List of Claim Terms For Which Constructions Will Be Proposed filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
September 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 151 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) Callwave Communications, LLC's Opening Claim Construction Brief; 2) Declaration of David Kotz, Ph.D.; and 3) Declaration of Jeffrey J. Evans, Ph.D. filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
September 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 150 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Responses to Defendants' Second Set of Common Interrogatories Relating to the Call Processing Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
September 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 149 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) Callwave Communications, LLC's Responses to Defendants' Second Set of Common Interrogatories Relating to the '933 Track; and 2) Callwave Communications, LLC's Responses to Defendants' Second Set of Common Interrogatories Relating to the '970 Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
August 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 148 NOTICE of Subpoena upon David Hofstatter by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Kraftschik, Stephen)
August 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 147 NOTICE of Subpoenas, by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-6)(Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 8/25/2014 (nms).
August 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 146 Joint APPENDIX, Vol. II of II re Claim Construction Chart, by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James) Modified on 8/15/2014 (nms).
August 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 145 Joint APPENDIX, Vol. I of II, re Claim Construction Chart, by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James) Modified on 8/15/2014 (nms).
August 15, 2014 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: The Joint Appendix entries filed on 8/15/2014, have been removed from the dockets. The filings were not formatted appropriately with proper cover pages providing the case caption and titles (Volumes I and II) for the filings. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
August 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 144 CLAIM Construction Chart for the '970 Track, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(McMillan, James) Modified on 8/15/2014 (nms).
August 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 143 CLAIM Construction Chart for '933 Track, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(McMillan, James) Modified on 8/15/2014 (nms).
August 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORAL ORDER: The Court will hear oral argument on the MOTION to Stay Proceedings on the '970 Patent Pending Inter Partes Review by the Patent Trial and Appeal Board (see D.I. 103 in 12-cv-01702-RGA, D.I. 96 in 12-cv-01704-RGA, D.I. 92 in 12-cv-01703-RGA, D.I. 104 in 12-cv-01701-RGA, D.I. 86 in 12-cv-01788-RGA) on 9/16/2014, at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/7/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
August 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 141 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Supplemental Responses to Defendants' First Set of Common Interrogatories Relating to the Call Processing Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
August 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 140 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Supplemental Responses to Defendants' First Set of Common Interrogatories Relating to the '933 Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
August 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 139 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Responses to Defendant AT&T Mobility, LLC's First Set of Requests For Production to Plaintiff Relating to the '933 Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
August 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 138 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Second Common Interrogatories to Plaintiff CallWave Communications, LLC Relating to the Call Processing Track (No. 7) filed by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P..(Kraftschik, Stephen)
August 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 137 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendants' Second Set of Common Interrogatories to Plaintiff Relating to the '933 Track (No. 7); and (2) Defendants' Second Common Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff Relating to the '970 Track (No. 9) filed by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P..(Kraftschik, Stephen)
August 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER Granting (114 in 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 77 in 1:13-cv-00711-RGA, 131 in 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 110 in 1:12-cv-01788-RGA, 124 in 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 132 in 1:12-cv-01701-RGA) Proposed Agreed Protective Order, filed by CallWave Communications LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/4/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA et al.(nms)
August 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 135 SO ORDERED Granting #127 Proposed Order Regarding Discovery, Including Discovery of Electronically Stored Information ("ESI"), filed by Google Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/4/2014. (nms)
August 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 134 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) Callwave Communications, LLC's Initial Proposed Claim Constructions for the '970 Track and 2) Callwave Communications, LLC's Initial Proposed Claim Constructions for the '933 Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
July 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 133 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendants' Initial Proposed Claim Constructions Relating to the '933 Patent; and (2) Defendants' Initial Proposed Claim Constructions Relating to the '970 Patent filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
July 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 132 PROPOSED Stipulated Protective Order, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Johnson, Edmond) Modified on 7/29/2014 (nms).
July 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 131 REQUEST for Oral Argument by AT & T Mobility LLC, Blackberry Corporation, Blackberry Limited, AT&T Inc., AT&T Mobility LLC, Google Inc., T-Moblie USA Inc., Cellco Partnership, Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P. re #104 MOTION to Stay. (Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 7/22/2014 (nms).
July 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 130 NOTICE of SERVICE of AT&T Mobility's Second Amended ESI Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the ESI Order - '933 Track by AT&T Mobility LLC (Schladweiler, Benjamin)
July 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 129 REPLY BRIEF re #107 MOTION to Amend Complaint filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (Johnson, Edmond)
July 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORAL ORDER: On the Letter, Exhibit A (see D.I. 70 in 13-cv-00711-RGA, D.I. 104 in 12-cv-01703-RGA, D.I. 112 in 12-cv-01704-RGA, D.I. 119 in 12-cv-01701-RGA, D.I. 119 in 12-cv-01702-RGA, D.I. 98 in 12-cv-01788-RGA), the Court prefers the more narrowly tailored CallWave position. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/17/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA et al.(nms)
July 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 127 Proposed Order Regarding Discovery, Including Discovery of Electronically Stored Information ("ESI"), by Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul) Modified on 7/17/2014 (nms).
July 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 126 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Paul Saindon regarding the proposed Protective Order and in response to CallWave's letter dated July 7, 2014. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-2)(Saindon, Paul)
July 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 125 REPLY BRIEF re #104 MOTION to Stay Proceedings on the '970 Patent Pending Inter Partes Review by the Patent Trial and Appeal Board filed by AT&T Inc., AT&T Mobility LLC, Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Dellinger, Megan)
July 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 124 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Callwave Communications, LLC's List of Claim Terms for which Constructions Will Be Proposed filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
July 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 123 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendants' Preliminary List of Claim Terms that Require Construction and/or are Indefinite for the '933 Track; and (2) Defendants' Preliminary List of Claim Terms that Require Construction and/or are Indefinite for the '970 Track filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
July 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 122 Official Transcript of Discovery Dispute held on 07-08-14 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leonard A. Dibbs. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/31/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/11/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/8/2014. (lad)
July 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 121 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Lauren Reznick as co-counsel. Reason for request: No longer with the firm.. (McMillan, James)
July 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Gregory S. Bishop for CallWave Communications LLC added for electronic noticing. (dmp, )
July 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Andrews - Discovery Conference held on 7/8/2014. (Court Reporter Leonard Dibbs.) Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA et al.(ksr, )
July 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #107 MOTION to Amend Complaint filed by Google Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 7/17/2014. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
July 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 119 Letter to Honorable Richard G. Andrews from James G. McMillan, III regarding Protective Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(McMillan, James) Modified on 7/8/2014 (nms).
July 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 118 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from James G. McMillan, III regarding CallWave Communications, LLC's Response to Defendants' July 3, 2014 letter. (McMillan, James) Modified on 7/8/2014 (nms).
July 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 117 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding discovery dispute. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-B)(Blumenfeld, Jack)
July 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #104 MOTION to Stay Proceedings on the '970 Patent Pending Inter Partes Review by the Patent Trial and Appeal Board, filed by CallWave Communications LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 7/14/2014. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-E, #2 Exhibits F-I, #3 Exhibits J-L, #4 Certificate of Service)(McMillan, James) Modified on 7/8/2014 (nms).
July 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 115 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from James G. McMillan, III regarding Discovery Dispute. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-F)(McMillan, James) Modified on 7/8/2014 (nms).
July 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 114 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding discovery dispute. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
July 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 113 NOTICE of Subpoena on Vipul Sawhney by Google Inc. (Attachments: #1 Subpoena)(Saindon, Paul)
June 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 112 NOTICE of SERVICE of (i) AT&T Mobility's First Amended ESI Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the ESI Order - '970 Track, (ii) Defendant AT&T Mobility's First Set of Requests for Production to Plaintiff Relating to the '933 Track, and (iii) AT&T Mobility's First Amended ESI Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the ESI Order - '933 Track by AT&T Mobility LLC (Schladweiler, Benjamin)
June 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 111 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Preliminary Invalidity Contentions Relating to the Call Processing Track filed by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P..(Tennyson, Eleanor)
June 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORAL ORDER: The parties have advised that a discovery dispute has arisen requiring judicial attention. The Court will hold a Discovery conference on 7/8/2014, at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews to take up this issue. In preparation for this conference the parties shall follow the Discovery Matters and Disputes procedure as set forth in the Scheduling Order. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/26/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA et al.(nms)
June 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 109 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Amended Disclosure of Defendant Google Inc. Pursuant to Paragraph 3.A of the Proposed Order Regarding Discovery filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
June 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 108 NOTICE of Subpoenas on Fuze Box, Inc. and FuzeBox Software Corp. by Google Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-4)(Saindon, Paul)
June 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Set Answering Brief Deadline re #107 MOTION to Amend Complaint. Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 7/7/2014. (nms)
June 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Set Answering Brief Deadline re 107 MOTION to Amend Complaint. Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 7/7/2014. (nms)
June 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 107 MOTION to Amend Complaint - filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Third Amended Complaint, #2 Redlined Version, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E)(Johnson, Edmond) Modified on 6/18/2014 (nms).
June 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 106 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Gregory S. Bishop - filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Edmond)
June 17, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (94 in 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 99 in 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 105 in 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 88 in 1:12-cv-01788-RGA, 106 in 1:12-cv-01701-RGA) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Gregory S. Bishop filed by CallWave Communications LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/17/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
June 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 105 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #104 MOTION to Stay Proceedings on the '970 Patent Pending Inter Partes Review by the Patent Trial and Appeal Board, filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, Google Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 7/3/2014. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-6)(Dellinger, Megan) Modified on 6/17/2014 (nms).
June 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 104 MOTION to Stay Proceedings on the '970 Patent Pending Inter Partes Review by the Patent Trial and Appeal Board - filed by AT & T Mobility LLC, Blackberry Corporation, Blackberry Limited, AT&T Mobility LLC, Google Inc., T-Moblie USA Inc., Cellco Partnership, Verizon Communications Inc., Sprint Nextel Corp.. (Dellinger, Megan) Modified on 6/17/2014 (nms).
June 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 103 NOTICE of Subpoenas on Fuze Box, Inc. and FuzeBox Software Corp. by Google Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 & 2)(Saindon, Paul)
May 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 102 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendants' Initial Invalidity Contentions on the '933 Patent and (2) Defendants' Initial Invalidity Contentions the '970 patent filed by Sprint Nextel Corp..(Kraftschik, Stephen)
May 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 101 NOTICE Of Service of Callwave Communications, LLC's Notice of Service of Subpoena to Amdocs, Inc. and Danal Inc., D/b/a Billtomobile filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(McMillan, James) Modified on 5/14/2014 (nms).
May 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 100 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) CallWave Communications, LLC's Disclosure of Infringement Contentions against Google, Inc. regarding the Call Processing Track and 2) CallWave Communications, LLC's Corrected Disclosure of Infringement Contentions against Google, Inc. regarding the Call Processing Track in C.A. No. 12-1701-RGA and C.A. No. 12-1704 filed by CallWave Communications LLC filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
May 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 99 NOTICE OF SERVICE of CallWave Communications, LLC's Responses to Google's First Set of Requests for Production to Plaintiff Relating to the Call Processing Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
May 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 98 NOTICE OF SERVICE of CallWave Communications, LLC's Responses to Google's First Set of Requests for Production to Plaintiff Relating to the '933 Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
May 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 97 NOTICE OF SERVICE of CallWave Communications, LLC's Responses to Google's First Set of Requests for Production to Plaintiff Relating to the 970 Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
April 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 96 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Benjamin Snitkoff as co-counsel. Reason for request: no longer with the firm. (Johnson, Edmond)
April 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 95 NOTICE OF SERVICE of CallWave Communications, LLC's Disclosures of Infringement Contentions Relating to the '933 Track and '970 Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
April 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Andrews - Discovery Conference held on 4/9/2014. (Court Reporter Heather Triozzi - Hawkins Reporting Service.) Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA et al.(ksr, )
April 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 94 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from James G. McMillan, III regarding Discovery Dispute - re (55 in 1:13-cv-00711-RGA) Letter. (McMillan, James)
April 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 93 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Paul Saindon regarding Protective Order and ESI Order Disputes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-10)(Saindon, Paul)
April 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 92 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) CallWave Communications, LLC's Responses to Defendants' First Common Set of Interrogatories Relating to the '970 Track; and 2) CallWave Communications, LLC's Responses to Defendants' First Set of Common Interrogatories Relating to the '933 Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
April 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 91 NOTICE OF SERVICE of CallWave Communications, LLC's Responses to Defendants' First Common Interrogatories Relating to the Call Processing Track (Nos. 1-6) filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
April 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 90 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Google's First Set of Requests for Production to Plaintiff Relating to the '933 Track filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
April 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 89 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Google's First Requests for Production to Plaintiff Relating to the Call Processing Track filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
April 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 88 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Google's First Set of Requests for Production to Plaintiff Relating to the '970 Track filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
April 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Leah R. McCoy,Suparna Datta for CallWave Communications LLC added for electronic noticing. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA et al.(dmp, )
March 28, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #87 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Suparna Datta filed by CallWave Communications LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/28/2014. (nms)
March 28, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 87 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Suparna Datta filed by CallWave Communications LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/28/2014. (nms)
March 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 87 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Suparna Datta - filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McMillan, James)
March 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 86 NOTICE OF SERVICE of CallWave Communications, LLC's Disclosure Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Default Discovery Standard filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
March 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 85 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Disclosure of Defendant Google Inc. Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Delaware Default Standard for Discovery and Paragraph 3 of the Proposed Order Regarding Discovery, Including Discovery of Electronically Stored Information filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
March 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 84 NOTICE of SERVICE of (i) AT&T Mobility's ESI Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the ESI Order (933 Patent Track), and (ii) AT&T Mobility's ESI Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the ESI Order (970 Patent Track) by AT&T Mobility LLC (Schladweiler, Benjamin)
March 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 83 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Leah R. McCoy - filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McMillan, James)
March 21, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 83 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Leah R. McCoy filed by CallWave Communications LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/21/2014. (nms)
March 21, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #83 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Leah R. McCoy filed by CallWave Communications LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/21/2014. (nms)
March 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Christopher Boundy for CallWave Communications LLC added for electronic noticing. (dmp, )
March 13, 2014 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER: The parties have advised that a discovery dispute has arisen requiring judicial attention. The Court will hold a Discovery conference on 4/9/2014, at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews, to take up this issue. In preparation for this conference the parties shall follow the Discovery Matters and Disputes procedure as set forth in the Scheduling Order.. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/13/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA et al.(ksr, )
March 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 82 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christopher Boundy - filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certification by Christopher Boundy, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(McMillan, James)
March 10, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 82 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christopher Boundy filed by CallWave Communications LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/10/2014. (nms)
March 10, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #82 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christopher Boundy filed by CallWave Communications LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/10/2014. (nms)
February 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 81 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' First Set of Common Interrogatories to Plaintiff Relating to the '970 Track filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
February 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 80 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' First Common Interrogatories to Plaintiff CallWave Communications, LLC Relating to the Call Processing Track filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
February 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 79 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' First Set of Common Interrogatories to Plaintiff Relating to the '933 Track filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
February 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 78 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Google's Responses to Plaintiff's First Requests for Production to Google Related to the Call Processing Track (1-11); (2) Google Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Callwave Communications, LLC's First Collective Requests for Production to all Defendants Related to the '933 Track (1-26); (3) Google Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Callwave Communications, LLC's First Collective Requests for Production to All Defendants Related to the '970 Track (1-26); (4) Google Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Callwave Communications, LLC's First Collective Requests for Production to all Defendants Related to the Call processing Track (1-26); (5) Google's Response to Plaintiff's First Interrogatories to Google Regarding the '933 Track (1); (6) Google Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Callwave Communications, LLC's First Interrogatories to Google Regarding the '970 Track (1); (7) Google Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Callwave Communications, LLC's First Interrogatories to Google Regarding the Call Processing Track (1); (8) Google's Response to Plaintiff's First Collective Interrogatories to the '933 Track Defendants (1-7); (9) Google's Responses to Plaintiff's First Collective Interrogatories to the '970 Track Defendants (1-7); and (10) Google's Responses to Plaintiff's First Collective Interrogatories to the Call Processing Track Defendants (1-7) filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
February 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 77 NOTICE of SERVICE of (i) Answers to Plaintiff's First Interrogatories to AT&T Mobility LLC regarding the '933 Track, (ii) Responses of AT&T Mobility LLC to Plaintiff's First Collective Interrogatories to '933 Track Defendants (1-7), (iii) Responses of AT&T Mobility LLC to Plaintiff's First Collective Requests for Production to All Defendants (Nos. 1-26), (iv) Answers to Plaintiff's First Interrogatories to AT&T Mobility LLC regarding the '970 Track, (v) Responses of AT&T Mobility LLC to Plaintiff's First Collective Interrogatories to '970 Track Defendants (1-7), and (vi) Responses of AT&T Mobility LLC to Plaintiff's First Collective Requests for Production to All Defendants (Nos. 1-26) by AT&T Mobility LLC (Schladweiler, Benjamin)
February 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ANSWER to #29 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand, by AT&T Mobility LLC.(Schladweiler, Benjamin) Modified on 2/26/2014 (nms).
February 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ANSWER to #29 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand, by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul) Modified on 2/25/2014 (nms).
February 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 74 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoena on Wavemarket, Inc. d/b/a LocationLabs filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(McMillan, James)
February 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 73 SO ORDERED, re (60 in 1:12-cv-01788-RGA, 60 in 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 68 in 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 72 in 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 65 in 1:12-cv-01703-RGA) MOTION to Set the Time to Answer the Complaints, filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, Google Inc., AT & T Mobility LLC, T-Moblie USA Inc., Cellco Partnership, Sprint Nextel Corp., Verizon Communications Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/4/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
February 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 72 MOTION to Set the Time to Answer the Complaints - filed by AT & T Mobility LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, Google Inc., T-Moblie USA Inc., Cellco Partnership, Verizon Communications Inc., Sprint Nextel Corp.. (Saindon, Paul)
January 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER: On or before February 13, 2014, each party or each party group shall email to Magistrate Judge Thynge, with a copy to her Judicial Administrator, Cathleen Kennedy, the information required in the Order. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 1/30/14. (cak)
January 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER Granting (D.I. 30 in 12-cv-01701-RGA) MOTION to Dismiss, and Granting in part and Denying in part (D.I. 32 in 12-cv-01701-RGA); Granting (D.I. 26 in 12-cv-01702-RGA) MOTION to Dismiss, and Granting in part and Denying in part (D.I. 28 in 12-cv-01702-RGA) MOTION to Dismiss; Granting (D.I. 27 in 12-cv-01703-RGA) MOTION to Dismiss, and Granting in part and Denying in part (D.I. 24 in 12-cv-01703-RGA) MOTION to Dismiss; Granting (D.I. 23 in 12-cv-01704-RGA) MOTION to Dismiss, and Granting in part and Denying in part (D.I. 25 in 12-cv-01704-RGA) MOTION to Dismiss; and Granting in part and Denying in part (D.I. 27 in 12-cv-01788-RGA) MOTION to Dismiss. Plaintiff is given leave to file a second amended complaint including indirect infringement claims within two weeks. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/28/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
January 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 69 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) Plaintiff's First Collective Interrogatories (1-7) to '933 Track Defendants, 2) Plaintiff's First Collective Interrogatories (1-7) to '970 Track Defendants; 3) Plaintiff's First Collective Requests for Production (1-26) to All '933 Track Defendants; and 4) Plaintiff's First Collective Requests for Production (1-26) to All '970 Track Defendants filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(Johnson, Edmond)
January 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 68 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's First Collective Interrogatories (1-7) to Call Processing Track Defendants AT&T Mobility, LLC, Google Inc., Sprint Nextel Corp., Verizon Comunications, Inc., Cellco Partnership, d.b.a. Verizon Wireless, and Broadsoft, Inc. and Plaintiff's First Collective Requests for Production (1-26) Related to All Call Processing Track Defendants AT&T Mobility, LLC, Google Inc., Sprint Nextel Corp., Verizon Comunications, Inc., Cellco Partnership, d.b.a. Verizon Wireless, and Broadsoft, Inc. filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(Johnson, Edmond)
January 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 67 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff CallWave Communications, LLC's Identification of Accused Products, Asserted Patents, and Asserted Claims to All Defendants filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(Johnson, Edmond)
January 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 66 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's First Interrogatories to AT&T Mobility, LLC Regarding the '970 Track (1) filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(Johnson, Edmond)
January 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 65 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's First Interrogatories to AT&T Mobility, LLC Regarding the '933 Track (1) filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(Johnson, Edmond)
January 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 64 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's First Request for Production of Documents to Google, Inc. Related to the Call Processing Track (1-11) filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(Johnson, Edmond)
January 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 63 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) Plaintiff's First Interrogatories to Google, Inc. Relating to the '970 Track (1); 2) Plaintiff's First Interrogatories to Google, Inc. Regarding the Call Processing Track (1); and 3) Plaintiff's First Interrogatories to Google, Inc. Regarding the '933 Track (1) filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(Johnson, Edmond)
January 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 62 NOTICE of SERVICE of (i) AT&T Mobility LLC's Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Fed R. Civ. P. 26 ('933 Patent Track), and (ii) AT&T Mobility LLC's Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Fed R. Civ. P. 26 ('970 Patent Track) - HIGHLY CONFIDENTIAL by AT&T Mobility LLC (Schladweiler, Benjamin)
January 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 61 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures of Google Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) filed by Google Inc..(Blumenfeld, Jack)
January 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 60 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff CallWave Communications, LLC's Rule 26(A) Initial Disclosures filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
January 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 59 NOTICE of Withdrawal of AT&T's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Standing on U.S. Patent No. 6,771,970 by AT&T Mobility LLC re #32 MOTION to Dismiss (Schladweiler, Benjamin)
January 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER Setting Teleconference: Counsel for Callwave to initiate the call. A Telephone Conference is set for 1/27/2014 at 2:30 PM EASTERN TIMNE before Judge Mary Pat Thynge to discuss ADR. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 1/7/14. (cak)
January 6, 2014 Opinion or Order CASE REFERRED to Judge Thynge for Mediation. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA, 1:13-cv-00711-RGA(cak)
December 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 57 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case referred to the Magistrate Judge for the purpose of exploring ADR. Joinder of Parties due by 6/17/2014. Amended Pleadings due by 6/17/2014. Fact Discovery due by 2/25/2015. A Trial Scheduling Conference is set for 8/28/2015, at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews Dispositive Motions due by 5/28/2015, and 8/7/2015. Joint Claim Construction Briefs due by 10/9/2014, and 12/10/2014. A Markman Hearings are set for 10/29/2014, and 1/7/2015, at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/20/2013. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA et al.(nms)
December 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 56 Proposed Scheduling Order, by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James) Modified on 12/20/2013 (nms).
December 20, 2013 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: DI 56 has been removed per request of the filer. (cla, )
December 20, 2013 Opinion or Order CASE REFERRED to Judge Thynge for Mediation. (cak)
December 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 55 Official Transcript of Scheduling Conference held on 12-12-13 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leonard A. DIbbs. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/7/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/17/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/17/2014. (lad)
December 12, 2013 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER: The Motion to Sever (D.I. #47 ) is DISMISSED AS PREMATURE, as discussed at the Rule 16 hearing on December 12, 2013. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/12/2013. (nms)
December 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Andrews - Scheduling Conference held on 12/12/2013. (Court Reporter Leonard Dibbs.) Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA et al.(ksr, )
December 12, 2013 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER: The Motion to Sever (D.I. 47 ) is DISMISSED AS PREMATURE, as discussed at the Rule 16 hearing on December 12, 2013. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/12/2013. (nms)
December 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 54 PROPOSED Scheduling Order, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Johnson, Edmond) Modified on 12/11/2013 (nms).
December 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 53 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding consideration of Defendants' motion to sever in connection with upcoming scheduling conference. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
December 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 52 REPLY BRIEF re #47 MOTION to Sever filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, Google Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
November 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #47 MOTION to Sever filed by CallWave Communications LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 12/5/2013. (McMillan, James)
November 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Order Setting Rule 16(b) Conference: A Scheduling Conference is set for 12/12/2013, at 1:00 PM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/18/2013. (nms)
November 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 49 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding pending motions to sever and scheduling conference. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
November 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 48 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #47 MOTION to Sever filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, Google Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 11/25/2013. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A-B, #2 Exhibit A)(Saindon, Paul)
November 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MOTION to Sever - filed by AT & T Mobility LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, Google Inc., T-Moblie USA Inc., Cellco Partnership, Verizon Communications Inc., Sprint Nextel Corp.. (Saindon, Paul)
November 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Edmond D. Johnson, Esq. regarding Request for a Scheduling Conference. (Johnson, Edmond)
September 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by CallWave Communications LLC identifying Corporate Parent no corporate parent or other affiliate for CallWave Communications LLC.. (McMillan, James)
September 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding response to Plaintiff's September 3, 2013 letter - re (18 in 1:13-cv-00711-RGA, 38 in 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 44 in 1:12-cv-01748-RGA, 36 in 1:12-cv-01788-RGA, 36 in 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 38 in 1:13-cv-00074-RGA, 33 in 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 43 in 1:12-cv-01701-RGA) Letter. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
September 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Edmond D. Johnson, Esq. regarding request for scheduling conference. (Johnson, Edmond)
July 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 42 NOTICE of Subsequent Authority by CallWave Communications LLC re Motions to Dismiss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(McMillan, James) Modified on 7/29/2013 (nms).
July 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 41 NOTICE of Subsequent Authority by AT&T Mobility LLC, T-Moblie USA Inc., Cellco Partnership, Google Inc., Verizon Communications Inc., Sprint Nextel Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Blumenfeld, Jack)
July 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 40 REPLY BRIEF re #30 MOTION to Dismiss, filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-D)(Saindon, Paul) Modified on 7/9/2013 (nms).
July 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 REPLY BRIEF re #32 MOTION to Dismiss, filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Schladweiler, Benjamin) Modified on 7/9/2013 (nms).
July 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 38 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for AT&T Mobility, LLC to file its reply brief in support of Defendant AT&T Mobility's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint to July 8, 2013 - filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, CallWave Communications LLC. (Schladweiler, Benjamin)
July 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant Google Inc. to file its reply brief in support of its motion to dismiss to July 8, 2013 - filed by Google Inc., CallWave Communications LLC. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
July 1, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 38 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for AT&T Mobility, LLC to file its reply brief in support 32 Motion to Dismiss to July 8, 2013, filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, CallWave Communications LLC (Reset Briefing Schedule: re 32 MOTION to Dismiss. Reply Brief due 7/8/2013). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/1/2013. (nms)
July 1, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #38 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for AT&T Mobility, LLC to file its reply brief in support #32 Motion to Dismiss to July 8, 2013, filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, CallWave Communications LLC (Reset Briefing Schedule: re #32 MOTION to Dismiss. Reply Brief due 7/8/2013). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/1/2013. (nms)
July 1, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (30 in 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 37 in 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 27 in 1:12-cv-01704-RGA) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant Google Inc. to file its reply brief in support of its Motion to dismiss to July 8, 2013, filed by Google Inc., CallWave Communications LLC (Reset Briefing Schedule: re 27 in 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 23 in 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 26 in 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 30 in 1:12-cv-01701-RGA; MOTIONS to Dismiss. Reply Briefs due 7/8/2013)s. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/1/2013. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(nms)
June 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #32 MOTION to Dismiss, and #30 MOTION to Dismiss, filed by CallWave Communications LLC. Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 7/1/2013. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(McMillan, James) Modified on 6/25/2013 (nms).
June 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Mark C. Nelson,Matthew P. Harper,Daniel A. Valenzuela for AT&T Mobility LLC added for electronic noticing. (dmp, )
June 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Mark C. Nelson, Matthew P. Harper and Daniel Valenzuela - filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Schladweiler, Benjamin)
June 18, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 35 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Mark C. Nelson, Matthew P. Harper and Daniel Valenzuela filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/18/2013. (nms)
June 18, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #35 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Mark C. Nelson, Matthew P. Harper and Daniel Valenzuela filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/18/2013. (nms)
June 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 34 DECLARATION of Joseph P. Zammit re #32 MOTION to Dismiss, by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Schladweiler, Benjamin) Modified on 6/4/2013 (nms).
June 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 33 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #32 MOTION to Dismiss, filed by AT&T Mobility LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 6/20/2013. (Schladweiler, Benjamin) Modified on 6/4/2013 (nms).
June 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MOTION to Dismiss - filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Schladweiler, Benjamin) Modified on 6/4/2013 (nms).
June 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 31 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #30 MOTION to Dismiss the Willful Infringement Claims in Callwave's Amended Complaints Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, filed by Google Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 6/20/2013. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 6/4/2013 (nms).
June 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MOTION to Dismiss the Willful Infringement Claims in Callwave's Amended Complaints Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure - filed by Google Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 6/4/2013 (nms).
May 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against AT&T Mobility LLC, Google Inc.- filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(nms)
May 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 SO ORDERED re #27 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer Second Amended Complaint to June 3, 2013, filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, Google Inc., AT&T Inc., CallWave Communications LLC (Reset Answer Deadlines: AT&T Mobility LLC answer due 6/3/2013; Google Inc. answer due 6/3/2013). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/3/2013. (nms)
May 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer Second Amended Complaint to June 3, 2013 - filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, CallWave Communications LLC, Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul) Modified on 5/7/2013 (ksr, ).
April 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 26 REPLY to #18 MOTION to Dismiss, filed by Google Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 4/30/2013 (nms).
April 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Joseph P. Zammit,Daniel S. Leventhal for AT&T Mobility LLC added for electronic noticing. (els)
April 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Remark: Set Answering Brief Deadline re #25 MOTION to Amend. Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 5/6/2013. (nms)
April 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Remark: Set Answering Brief Deadline re 25 MOTION to Amend. Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 5/6/2013. (nms)
April 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MOTION to Amend - filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to the Motion to Amend, #2 Second Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit A to Second Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit B to Second Amended Complaint, #5 Exhibit C to Second Amended Complaint, #6 Exhibit D to Second Amended Complaint, #7 Exhibit E to Second Amended Complaint, #8 Redlined Version of Second Amended Complaint)(McMillan, James) Modified on 4/19/2013 (nms).
April 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #18 MOTION to Dismiss, #21 MOTION to Dismiss filed by CallWave Communications LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 4/29/2013. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(McMillan, James)
April 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by AT&T Mobility LLC identifying Corporate Parent AT&T Inc., Other Affiliate SBC Long Distance, LLC, Other Affiliate SBC Telecom, Inc., Other Affiliate BellSouth Mobile Data, Inc. for AT&T Mobility LLC.. (Schladweiler, Benjamin)