CallWave Communication LLCv. Sprint Nextel Corp. et al. Featured Case

Plaintiff: CallWave Communications LLC
Defendant: Sprint Nextel Corp. and Google Inc.
Case Number: 1:2012cv01702
Filed: December 12, 2012
Court: Delaware District Court
Office: Wilmington Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Andrews
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 16, 2017 651 MANDATE of USCA as to 510 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit), filed by CallWave Communications LLC. USCA Decision: USDC Decision Affirmed. (Attachments: # 1 Judgment)(nms)
December 22, 2016 650 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Paul Saindon as co-counsel. Reason for request: No longer with firm. (Saindon, Paul)
December 16, 2016 649 Featured Case ORAL ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (D.I. 649 in 12cv1701-RGA, D.I. 567 in 12cv1702-RGA, and D.I. 576 in 12cv1704-RGA) is DENIED. Plaintiff has not established that Defendant's Motion was untimely or that Defendant waived the defense. Even if the Motion were untimely, Plaintiff has not shown prejudice or bad faith to support the extreme sanction of striking this motion. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/16/2016. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(nms)
November 2, 2016 648 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from James G. McMillan, III regarding Callwave's request for oral argument on its Motion to Strike Google, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment That All Asserted Claims of the Patents-In-Suit Are Invalid Under § 101. (McMillan, James)
November 1, 2016 647 Featured Case SO ORDERED Granting (654 in 12-cv-1704-RGA, 645 in 12-cv-1702-RGA, 727 in 12-cv-1701-RGA) Stipulation and Order withdrawing motion. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/1/2016. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(nms)
October 31, 2016 646 Joint STATUS Letter, by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James) Modified on 11/1/2016 (nms).
October 31, 2016 645 STIPULATION to Withdraw Motion to Strike Googles Undisclosed Invalidity Defense Under 35 U.S.C. § 102(g), by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James) Modified on 11/1/2016 (nms).
October 31, 2016 CORRECTING ENTRY: The link and docket text in D.I. 644 have been corrected to reflect a relationship to the correct motion they are in reference to. (nms)
October 31, 2016 644 REPLY BRIEF re 567 MOTION to Strike Motion for Summary Judgment that All Asserted Claims of the Patents-In-Suit are Invalid Under Section 101, filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits I-K, # 2 Exhibit L, # 3 Exhibits M-N)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/31/2016 (nms).
October 31, 2016 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re (643 in 12-cv-1702-RGA, 725 in 12-cv-1701-RGA, 397 in 13-cv-711-RGA, 652 in 12-cv-1704-RGA) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for joint status report to October 31, 2016, filed by CallWave Communications LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/31/2016. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:13-cv-00711-RGA(nms)
October 28, 2016 643 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for joint status report to October 31, 2016 - filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James)
October 28, 2016 642 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from James G. McMillan, III regarding Callwave's request for oral argument. (McMillan, James) Modified on 10/31/2016 (nms).
October 28, 2016 641 REDACTED VERSION of 624 Declaration, by Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul) Modified on 10/31/2016 (nms).
October 28, 2016 640 REDACTED VERSION of 622 Declaration, by Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul) Modified on 10/31/2016 (nms).
October 28, 2016 639 REDACTED VERSION of 621 Reply Brief, by Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul) Modified on 10/31/2016 (nms).
October 28, 2016 638 REDACTED VERSION of 619 Declaration, by Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul) Modified on 10/31/2016 (nms).
October 28, 2016 637 REDACTED VERSION of 617 Reply Brief, by Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul) Modified on 10/31/2016 (nms).
October 28, 2016 636 REDACTED VERSION of 616 Reply Brief, by Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul) Modified on 10/31/2016 (nms).
October 28, 2016 635 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Paul Saindon regarding Google's request for oral argument on pending motions. (Saindon, Paul) Modified on 10/31/2016 (nms).
October 27, 2016 CORRECTING ENTRY: The docket text and pdf for the Reply Brief filed on 10/21/2016, relating to the Testimony by CallWave's Experts Philip Green and David Lucantoni has been amended per counsel's request. The filing is now under seal. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA(nms)
October 26, 2016 634 REDACTED VERSION of 615 Declaration of Dat Nguyen, by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-B)(Saindon, Paul) Modified on 10/27/2016 (nms).
October 26, 2016 633 REDACTED VERSION of 620 Reply Brief, by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James) Modified on 10/26/2016 (nms).
October 25, 2016 632 REDACTED VERSION of 613 Exhibits H, Part 2, I, Parts 1 and 2 and J-L, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit H, Part 2, # 2 Exhibit I, Part 1, # 3 Exhibit I, Part 2, # 4 Exhibit J, # 5 Exhibit K, # 6 Exhibit L)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/25/2016 (nms).
October 25, 2016 631 REDACTED VERSION of 612 Exhibits G Parts 1 and 2 and H, Part 1, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit G, Part 1.1, # 2 Exhibit G, Part 1.2, # 3 Exhibit G, Part 2, # 4 Exhibit H, Part 1)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/25/2016 (nms).
October 25, 2016 630 REDACTED VERSION of 611 Exhibit E Parts 1, 2, and 3, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit E, Part 1, # 2 Exhibit E, Part 2, # 3 Exhibit E, Part 3)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/25/2016 (nms).
October 25, 2016 629 REDACTED VERSION of 610 Exhibit D, Part 2, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit D, Part 2)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/25/2016 (nms).
October 25, 2016 628 REDACTED VERSION of 609 Exhibit D, Part 1, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit D, Part 1)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/25/2016 (nms).
October 25, 2016 627 REDACTED VERSION of 608 Exhibit C, Part 4, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit C, Part 4)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/25/2016 (nms).
October 25, 2016 626 REDACTED VERSION of 607 Exhibits B, C Part 1, C Part 2 and C Part 3, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B, Part 1, # 2 Exhibit B, Part 2, # 3 Exhibit C, Part 1, # 4 Exhibit C, Part 2, # 5 Exhibit C, Part 3a, # 6 Exhibit C, Part 3b)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/25/2016 (nms).
October 24, 2016 625 NOTICE of Joinder in BroadSoft's Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity, by Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul) Modified on 10/25/2016 (nms).
October 21, 2016 624 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Nathaniel T. Browand re 623 Reply Brief, by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-4)(Saindon, Paul) Modified on 10/24/2016 (nms).
October 21, 2016 623 REPLY BRIEF re 536 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of All Asserted Claims of the '110, '910, and '901 Patents Based on Prior Art filed by Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul)
October 21, 2016 622 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Dat Nguyen re 621 Reply Brief, by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 11-17)(Saindon, Paul) Modified on 10/24/2016 (nms).
October 21, 2016 621 [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re 542 MOTION to Preclude Expert Testimony of Dr. David Lucantoni on Conception, Reduction to Practice, Diligence, Secondary Considerations of Non-Obviousness, and U.S. Patent No. 6,353,660 (Burger) filed by Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul)
October 21, 2016 620 [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re 548 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of W. Christopher Bakewell filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James)
October 21, 2016 619 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Nathaniel T. Browand re 618 Reply Brief, by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-2)(Saindon, Paul) Modified on 10/24/2016 (nms).
October 21, 2016 618 REPLY BRIEF re 539 MOTION for Summary Judgment that All Asserted Claims of the Patents-In-Suit are Invalid Under Section 101 filed by Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul)
October 21, 2016 617 SEALED REPLY BRIEF re 545 MOTION to Preclude Testimony by CallWave's Experts Philip Green and David Lucantoni Concerning Alleged Damages, filed by Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul) Modified on 10/27/2016 (nms). (Main Document 617 replaced on 10/27/2016) (nms).
October 21, 2016 616 [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re 550 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Based on BroadWorks and Joinder in BroadSoft's Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity filed by Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul)
October 20, 2016 615 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Dat Nguyen re 614 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-B)(Saindon, Paul) Modified on 10/21/2016 (nms).
October 20, 2016 614 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 567 MOTION to Strike Motion for Summary Judgment that All Asserted Claims of the Patents-In-Suit are Invalid Under Section 101 filed by Google Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 10/31/2016. (Saindon, Paul)
October 19, 2016 613 [SEALED] EXHIBITS to 601 Opening Brief in Support, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit H Part 2, # 2 Exhibit I Part 1, # 3 Exhibit I Part 2, # 4 Exhibit J, # 5 Exhibit K, # 6 Exhibit L)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/19/2016 (nms).
October 19, 2016 612 [SEALED] EXHIBITS to 601 Opening Brief in Support, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit G Part 1, # 2 Exhibit G Part 2, # 3 Exhibit H Part 1)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/19/2016 (nms).
October 19, 2016 611 [SEALED] EXHIBITS to 601 Opening Brief in Support, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit E Part 1, # 2 Exhibit E Part 2, # 3 Exhibit E Part 3)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/19/2016 (nms).
October 19, 2016 610 [SEALED] EXHIBITS to 601 Opening Brief in Support, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit D Part 2)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/19/2016 (nms).
October 19, 2016 609 [SEALED] EXHIBITS to 601 Opening Brief in Support, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit D Part 1)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/19/2016 (nms).
October 19, 2016 608 [SEALED] EXHIBITS to 601 Opening Brief in Support, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit C Part 4)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/19/2016 (nms).
October 19, 2016 607 [SEALED] EXHIBITS to 601 Opening Brief in Support, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B, # 2 Exhibit C Part 1, # 3 Exhibit C Part 2, # 4 Exhibit C Part 3a, # 5 Exhibit C Part 3b)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/19/2016 (nms).
October 19, 2016 606 EXHIBITS to 601 Opening Brief in Support, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit F, # 2 Exhibit M, # 3 Exhibit N, # 4 Exhibit O, # 5 Exhibit P)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/19/2016 (nms).
October 19, 2016 605 EXHIBIT A, part 4 to 601 Opening Brief in Support, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Part 4)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/19/2016 (nms).
October 19, 2016 604 EXHIBIT A, part 3 to 601 Opening Brief in Support, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Part 3)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/19/2016 (nms).
October 19, 2016 603 EXHIBIT A, part 2 601 Opening Brief in Support, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Part 2)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/19/2016 (nms).
October 19, 2016 602 EXHIBIT A, part 1 to 601 Opening Brief in Support, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Part 1)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/19/2016 (nms).
October 19, 2016 CORRECTING ENTRY: The exhibits filed at D.I. 602 and D.I. 603 have been removed from the docket. Counsel shall re-file the exhibits as a multi-volume filing. (nms)
October 18, 2016 601 OPENING BRIEF in Support re 600 MOTION to Strike Googles Undisclosed Invalidity Defense Under 35 U.S.C. § 102(g), filed by CallWave Communications LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 11/4/2016. (McMillan, James) Modified on 10/19/2016 (nms).
October 18, 2016 600 MOTION to Strike Googles Undisclosed Invalidity Defense Under 35 U.S.C. § 102(g) - filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James) Modified on 10/19/2016 (nms).
October 11, 2016 599 REDACTED VERSION of 579 Exhibits B, C, G & H to Declaration of Gregory S. Bishop, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits B, C, G and H)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/11/2016 (nms).
October 11, 2016 598 REDACTED VERSION of 577 Answering Brief in Opposition, by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James) Modified on 10/11/2016 (nms).
October 10, 2016 597 REDACTED VERSION of 581 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul) Modified on 10/11/2016 (nms).
October 10, 2016 596 REDACTED VERSION of 588 Exhibits A-B to Declaration of L. Andrew Tseng, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-B)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/11/2016 (nms).
October 10, 2016 595 REDACTED VERSION of 586 Answering Brief in Opposition, by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James) Modified on 10/11/2016 (nms).
October 6, 2016 594 REDACTED VERSION of 574 Exhibits B-F in support to Declaration of Megan E. L. Bigelow, by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James) Modified on 10/7/2016 (nms).
October 6, 2016 593 REDACTED VERSION of 572 Answering Brief in Opposition, by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James) Modified on 10/7/2016 (nms).
October 6, 2016 592 REDACTED VERSION of 585 Exhibits B, D, and I to Declaration of Suparna Datta, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits B-I)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/7/2016 (nms).
October 6, 2016 591 REDACTED VERSION of 582 Declaration of Dr. David Lucantoni, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix B)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/7/2016 (nms).
October 6, 2016 590 REDACTED VERSION of 580 Answering Brief in Opposition, by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James) Modified on 10/7/2016 (nms).
October 6, 2016 589 REDACTED VERSION of 569 Exhibits G and H in support of Memorandum in support, by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James) Modified on 10/7/2016 (nms).
October 5, 2016 CORRECTING ENTRY: The Notice of Appearance filed at D.I. 571 on 10/4/2016, has been removed from the docket. This filing was done in error. (nms)
October 4, 2016 588 [SEALED] EXHIBITS re 587 Declaration of L. Andrew Tseng, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-B, # 2 Certificate of Service)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/5/2016 (nms).
October 4, 2016 587 DECLARATION of L. Andrew Tseng re 586 Answering Brief in Opposition, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit C)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/5/2016 (nms).
October 4, 2016 586 [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 550 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Based on BroadWorks and Joinder in BroadSoft's Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity filed by CallWave Communications LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 10/14/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(McMillan, James)
October 4, 2016 585 [SEALED] EXHIBITS re 584 Declaration of Suparna Datta, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B, # 2 Exhibit D, # 3 Exhibit I, # 4 Certificate of Service)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/5/2016 (nms).
October 4, 2016 584 DECLARATION of Suparna Datta re 580 Answering Brief in Opposition, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit C, # 3 Exhibit E, # 4 Exhibit F, # 5 Exhibit G, # 6 Exhibit H)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/5/2016 (nms).
October 4, 2016 583 APPENDIX re 582 Declaration of Dr. David Lucantoni, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A, # 2 Appendicies C-H)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/5/2016 (nms). Modified on 10/5/2016 (nms).
October 4, 2016 582 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Dr. David Lucantoni re 580 Answering Brief in Opposition, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix B, # 2 Certificate of Service)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/5/2016 (nms).
October 4, 2016 581 [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 548 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of W. Christopher Bakewell filed by Google Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 10/14/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-3, # 2 Exhibits 4-8)(Saindon, Paul)
October 4, 2016 580 [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 536 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of All Asserted Claims of the '110, '910, and '901 Patents Based on Prior Art filed by CallWave Communications LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 10/14/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(McMillan, James)
October 4, 2016 579 [SEALED] EXHIBITS re 578 Declaration of Gregory S. Bishop, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B, # 2 Exhibit C, # 3 Exhibit G, # 4 Exhibit H, # 5 Certificate of Service)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/5/2016 (nms).
October 4, 2016 578 DECLARATION of Gregory S. Bishop re 577 Answering Brief in Opposition, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit D, # 3 Exhibit E, # 4 Exhibit F)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/5/2016 (nms).
October 4, 2016 577 [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 542 MOTION to Preclude Expert Testimony of Dr. David Lucantoni on Conception, Reduction to Practice, Diligence, Secondary Considerations of Non-Obviousness, and U.S. Patent No. 6,353,660 (Burger) filed by CallWave Communications LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 10/14/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(McMillan, James)
October 4, 2016 576 DECLARATION of Gregory S. Bishop re 575 Answering Brief in Opposition, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/5/2016 (nms).
October 4, 2016 575 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 539 MOTION for Summary Judgment that All Asserted Claims of the Patents-In-Suit are Invalid Under Section 101 filed by CallWave Communications LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 10/14/2016. (McMillan, James)
October 4, 2016 574 [SEALED] EXHIBITS re 573 Declaration of Megan E.L. Bigelow, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B, # 2 Exhibit C, # 3 Exhibit D, # 4 Exhibit E, # 5 Exhibit F, # 6 Certificate of Service)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/5/2016 (nms).
October 4, 2016 573 DECLARATION of Megan E. L. Bigelow re 572 Answering Brief in Opposition, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit G)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/5/2016 (nms).
October 4, 2016 572 [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 545 MOTION to Preclude Testimony by CallWave's Experts Philip Green and David Lucantoni Concerning Alleged Damages filed by CallWave Communications LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 10/14/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(McMillan, James)
October 3, 2016 570 7.1.1 Certification re 567 Motion to Strike, by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James) Modified on 10/4/2016 (nms).
October 3, 2016 569 [SEALED] EXHIBITS re 568 Opening Brief in Support, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit G, # 2 Exhibit H, # 3 Certificate of Service)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/4/2016 (nms).
October 3, 2016 568 OPENING BRIEF in Support re 567 MOTION to Strike Motion for Summary Judgment that All Asserted Claims of the Patents-In-Suit are Invalid Under Section 101, filed by CallWave Communications LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 10/20/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-F)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/4/2016 (nms).
October 3, 2016 567 MOTION to Strike Motion for Summary Judgment that All Asserted Claims of the Patents-In-Suit are Invalid Under Section 101 - filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James) Modified on 10/4/2016 (nms).
September 30, 2016 566 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Noah V. Malgeri as co-counsel. Reason for request: he is no longer with the firm.. (McMillan, James)
September 27, 2016 565 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Leah R. McCoy as co-counsel. Reason for request: no longer with the firm. (McMillan, James)
September 16, 2016 564 REDACTED VERSION of 553 Exhibits, by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James) Modified on 9/19/2016 (nms).
September 16, 2016 563 REDACTED VERSION of 549 Opening Brief in Support, by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James) Modified on 9/19/2016 (nms).
September 16, 2016 562 REDACTED VERSION of 550 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Based on BroadWorks and Joinder in BroadSoft's Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity, by Google Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 9/19/2016 (nms).
September 16, 2016 561 REDACTED VERSION of 547 Declaration, by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-7)(Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 9/19/2016 (nms).
September 16, 2016 560 REDACTED VERSION of 546 Opening Brief in Support, by Google Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 9/19/2016 (nms).
September 16, 2016 559 REDACTED VERSION of 544 Declaration, by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-10)(Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 9/19/2016 (nms).
September 16, 2016 558 REDACTED VERSION of 543 Opening Brief in Support, by Google Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 9/19/2016 (nms).
September 16, 2016 557 REDACTED VERSION of 538 Declaration, by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibits 4-16)(Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 9/19/2016 (nms).
September 16, 2016 556 REDACTED VERSION of 537 Opening Brief in Support, by Google Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 9/19/2016 (nms).
September 15, 2016 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re (633 in 12-cv-1701-RGA, 561 in 12-cv-1704-RGA, 319 in 13-cv-711-RGA, 555 in 12-cv-1702-RGA) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Responses to Motions for Summary Judgment, Daubert Motions, and Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and Reply Briefs to October 4, 2016, and October 21, 2016, filed by CallWave Communications LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/15/2016. Associated Cases: 12-cv-1701-RGA, 12-cv-1702-RGA, 12-cv-1704-RGA, 13-cv-711-RGA(nms)
September 14, 2016 555 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Responses to Motions for Summary Judgment, Daubert Motions, and Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and Reply Briefs to October 4, 2016 and October 21, 2016 - filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James)
September 14, 2016 554 NOTICE Regarding Joinder in Broadsoft's Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity by Google Inc. (see Motion and Joinder filed at D.I. 550 ). (Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 9/14/2016 (nms).
September 12, 2016 CORRECTING ENTRY: The pdf for D.I. 537 has been replaced with a corrected version per counsel's request. (nms)
September 12, 2016 CORRECTING ENTRY: The pdf for D.I. 540 has been replaced per counsel's request. The table of contents has been corrected. (nms)
September 12, 2016 553 [SEALED] EXHIBITS to 549 Opening Brief in Support, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit C, # 3 Exhibit D Part 1, # 4 Exhibit D Part 2, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H)(McMillan, James) Modified on 9/12/2016 (nms).
September 12, 2016 CORRECTING ENTRY: D.I. 553 and 554 have been removed from the docket. Counsel shall re-file the exhibits used at these entries all together at one docket item entry. (nms)
September 12, 2016 CORRECTING ENTRY: The Notice of Multi-Media filing (D.I. 551) has been removed from the docket. Counsel has been advised as to how to proceed with the filing, and shall do so accordingly (nms)
September 9, 2016 552 EXHIBITS re 549 Opening Brief in Support, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B, # 2 Exhibit I)(McMillan, James) Modified on 9/12/2016 (nms).
September 9, 2016 550 [SEALED] MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Based on BroadWorks and Joinder in BroadSoft's Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity - filed by Google Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 9/12/2016 (nms).
September 9, 2016 549 [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re 548 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of W. Christopher Bakewell, filed by CallWave Communications LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 9/26/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(McMillan, James) Modified on 9/12/2016 (nms).
September 9, 2016 548 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of W. Christopher Bakewell - filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 7.1.1 Statement)(McMillan, James) Modified on 9/12/2016 (nms).
September 9, 2016 547 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Dat Nguyen re 545 MOTION to Preclude Testimony by CallWave's Experts Philip Green and David Lucantoni Concerning Alleged Damages, by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-7)(Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 9/12/2016 (nms).
September 9, 2016 546 [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re 545 MOTION to Preclude Testimony by CallWave's Experts Philip Green and David Lucantoni Concerning Alleged Damages, filed by Google Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 9/26/2016. (Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 9/12/2016 (nms).
September 9, 2016 545 MOTION to Preclude Testimony by CallWave's Experts Philip Green and David Lucantoni Concerning Alleged Damages - filed by Google Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 9/12/2016 (nms).
September 9, 2016 544 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Dat Nguyen re 542 MOTION to Preclude Expert Testimony of Dr. David Lucantoni on Conception, Reduction to Practice, Diligence, Secondary Considerations of Non-Obviousness, and U.S. Patent No. 6,353,660 (Burger), by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-8, # 2 Exhibits 9-10)(Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 9/12/2016 (nms).
September 9, 2016 543 [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re 542 MOTION to Preclude Expert Testimony of Dr. David Lucantoni on Conception, Reduction to Practice, Diligence, Secondary Considerations of Non-Obviousness, and U.S. Patent No. 6,353,660 (Burger), filed by Google Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 9/26/2016. (Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 9/12/2016 (nms).
September 9, 2016 542 MOTION to Preclude Expert Testimony of Dr. David Lucantoni on Conception, Reduction to Practice, Diligence, Secondary Considerations of Non-Obviousness, and U.S. Patent No. 6,353,660 (Burger) - filed by Google Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 9/12/2016 (nms).
September 9, 2016 541 DECLARATION of Dat Nguyen re 539 MOTION for Summary Judgment that All Asserted Claims of the Patents-In-Suit are Invalid Under Section 101, by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-13)(Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 9/9/2016 (nms).
September 9, 2016 540 OPENING BRIEF in Support re 539 MOTION for Summary Judgment that All Asserted Claims of the Patents-In-Suit are Invalid Under Section 101. filed by Google Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 9/26/2016. (Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 9/9/2016 (nms). (Main Document 540 replaced on 9/12/2016) (nms).
September 9, 2016 539 MOTION for Summary Judgment that All Asserted Claims of the Patents-In-Suit are Invalid Under Section 101 - filed by Google Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 9/9/2016 (nms).
September 9, 2016 538 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Nathaniel T. Browand re 536 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of All Asserted Claims of the '110, '910, and '901 Patents Based on Prior Art, by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibits 4-12, # 5 Exhibits 13-16)(Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 9/9/2016 (nms).
September 9, 2016 537 [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re 536 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of All Asserted Claims of the '110, '910, and '901 Patents Based on Prior Art, filed by Google Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 9/26/2016. (Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 9/9/2016 (nms). (Main Document 537 replaced on 9/12/2016) (nms).
September 9, 2016 536 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of All Asserted Claims of the '110, '910, and '901 Patents Based on Prior Art - filed by Google Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 9/9/2016 (nms).
August 16, 2016 535 NOTICE of Name Change and Email for Megan E. Lantto Pro Hac Vice by CallWave Communications LLC (McMillan, James)
July 21, 2016 534 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Bryana T. McGillycuddy as co-counsel. Reason for request: She is no longer with the firm.. (McMillan, James)
July 15, 2016 533 NOTICE of Deposition and Subpoena of Samuel Hoffpauir by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Saindon, Paul)
July 12, 2016 532 NOTICE of Firm Telephone Number Change, by Paul Saindon (Saindon, Paul) Modified on 7/13/2016 (nms).
July 11, 2016 531 NOTICE of Change of Address by Paul Saindon (Saindon, Paul)
July 6, 2016 530 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Google Inc.'s Third Supplemental Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
June 27, 2016 529 Redaction version of (D.I. 509 in 12-cv-1702-RGA, D.I. 500 in 12-cv-1704-RGA, D.I. 523 in 12-cv-1701-RGA, D.I. 345 in 12-cv-01703-RGA) Sealed Transcript. (nms)
June 27, 2016 528 Featured Case ORDER Granting CallWave Communications, LLC's Unopposed MOTION to Seal Confidential Portions of the Transcript of the Hearing Before Special Master Saville on February, 24, 2016. Signed by Special Master Yvonne Saville on 6/27/2016. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(nms)
June 27, 2016 CORRECTING ENTRY: The pdf for the Sealed Transcript of the February 24, 2016, conference before the Special Master has been replaced. The reference to Civil Action 13-711-RGA has been removed, and a reference to Civil Action 12-1703-RGA has been added. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(nms)
June 23, 2016 CORRECTING ENTRY: The pdf for exhibits A-D attached to the redacted filing dated 3/21/2016, has been replaced with an amended version per counsel's request. Exhibit B has now been fully redacted. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA(nms)
June 16, 2016 527 Featured Case MEMORANDUM ORDER: Plaintiffs objections to the Report and Recommendation Relative to the Parties Motions to Strike and other Discovery issues are OVERRULED, and the Court ADOPTS the Rulings and Recommendations Relative to the Parties Motions to Strike and other Discovery Issues. Plaintiffs motion to strike (D.I. 427; No. 12-1702, D.I. 446; No. 12-1704, D.I. 407; No. 13-711, D.I. 241) is DENIED. Defendants motion to strike (D.I. 448; No. 12-1702, D.I. 457; No. 12-1704, D.I. 407; No. 13-711, D.I. 252) is DENIED. The motion to expedite the briefing (D.I. 429, No. 12-1702, D.I. 447; No. 12-1704, D.I. 408; No. 13-711, D.I. 242) is DISMISSED as moot. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/16/2016. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:13-cv-00711-RGA(nms)
June 15, 2016 526 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from James G. McMillan, III regarding response to Court's Oral Order issued earlier today. (McMillan, James) Modified on 6/15/2016 (nms).
June 15, 2016 525 Featured Case ORAL ORDER: CallWave is directed to send a letter to the Court today advising whether the depositions of Dr. Elderling and Mr. Hoffpauir have occurred, or are scheduled, and, if so, when. Further, if they have occurred, and were after December 17, 2015, were they questioned about "Shared Call Appearance"?. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/15/2016. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:13-cv-00711-RGA(nms)
June 13, 2016 524 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Christopher Boundy as co-counsel. Reason for request: no longer with firm. (McMillan, James)
April 29, 2016 523 NOTICE of Petition for Covered Business Method Review by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Petition)(Blumenfeld, Jack)
April 4, 2016 522 REDACTED VERSION of 519 MOTION to Seal, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-D)(McMillan, James) Modified on 4/4/2016 (nms).
April 1, 2016 521 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Callwave Communications, LLC's Third Supplemental Responses and Objections to Google's First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff Relating to the '970 Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
March 30, 2016 520 7.1.1 Certification by CallWave Communications LLC re MOTION to Seal.(McMillan, James) Modified on 3/31/2016 (nms).
March 28, 2016 519 [SEALED] MOTION to Seal Confidential Portions of the Transcript of the Hearing Before Special Master Saville on February 24, 2016- filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D)(McMillan, James) Modified on 3/29/2016 (nms).
March 24, 2016 518 Amended TRANSCRIPT REQUEST, by CallWave Communications LLC - A Transcript is Already on File. (McMillan, James) Modified on 3/29/2016 (nms).
March 21, 2016 517 REDACTED VERSION of 515 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Transcript, by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-D, # 2 Proposed Order)(Saindon, Paul) Modified on 3/21/2016 (nms).
March 16, 2016 516 Featured Case ORDER granting (530) [SEALED] Unopposed MOTION to Seal Transcript in case 1:12-cv-01701-RGA; granting (515) Motion to Seal Document in case 1:12-cv-01702-RGA; granting (351) Motion to Seal Document in case 1:12-cv-01703-RGA; granting (507) Motion to Seal Document in case 1:12-cv-01704-RGA. Signed by Yvonne Saville, Special Master on 3/16/2016. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(ksr, )
March 15, 2016 CORRECTING ENTRY: A proposed order has been added to the Unopposed Motion to Seal Confidential Portions of the Transcript of the Hearing Before Special Master Saville on February 24, 2016, filed on March 14, 2016. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(nms)
March 14, 2016 515 [SEALED] Unopposed MOTION to Seal Transcript - filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-D)(Saindon, Paul) Modified on 3/15/2016 (nms). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/15/2016: # 3 Proposed Order) (nms).
March 14, 2016 514 CORRECTED NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA for the Federal Circuit re 510 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit), filed by CallWave Communications LLC. USCA Case Number 16-1685. (nms)
March 14, 2016 513 NOTICE of Subsequent Authority (Peschke Map Technologies LLC v. Rouse Properties Inc.) by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Saindon, Paul)
March 11, 2016 512 NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA for the Federal Circuit re 510 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit), filed by CallWave Communications LLC. USCA Case Number 16-1685. (nms)
March 10, 2016 511 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by CallWave Communications LLC for proceedings held on February 9, 2016 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Transcript Not Needed. (McMillan, James) Modified on 3/10/2016 (nms).
March 10, 2016 Notification regarding 510 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit) sent to Reporter Dibbs. (cna)
March 10, 2016 APPEAL - Credit Card Payment of $505.00 received re 510 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit) filed by CallWave Communications LLC. ( Filing fee $505, receipt number 0311-1892643.) (McMillan, James)
March 10, 2016 510 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Federal Circuit of 495 Order, 497 Judgment, . Appeal filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James)
March 7, 2016 509 Official Transcript of Discovery Conference held on 2/24/2016 before Judge Special Master Yvonne T. Saville. Court Reporter/Transcriber Basye Santiago Reporting,Telephone number 302-573-2300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 3/28/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/7/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/6/2016. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA -RGA(ksr, ) Modified on 3/9/2016 (ksr, ).
March 7, 2016 508 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Fifth Supplemental Responses to Defendant' First Common Set of Interrogatories Relating to the '970 Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
March 3, 2016 507 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Second Supplemental Responses and Objections to Google's First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff Callwave Communications, LLC Relating to the '970 Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
March 2, 2016 506 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Response and Objections to Defendants' Notice of Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition to Plaintiff Callwave Communications, LLC Related to the '970 Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
March 1, 2016 505 REDACTED VERSION of 503 Letter, by Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul) Modified on 3/1/2016 (nms).
March 1, 2016 REDACTION NOTICE: In accordance with section G of the Administrative Procedures Governing Filing and Service by Electronic Means, redacted versions of sealed documents shall be filed electronically within 7 days of the filing of the sealed document. The records of this case do not reflect the filing of a redacted version of DI # 503 . (nms)
February 19, 2016 504 REDACTED VERSION of 498 MOTION to Redact Transcript of the Hearing Before Special Master Saville on January 8, 2016, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits C-D)(McMillan, James) Modified on 2/19/2016 (nms).
February 18, 2016 503 [SEALED] Letter to Special Master Saville from Paul Saindon regarding Discovery. (Saindon, Paul)
February 17, 2016 502 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Google Inc.'s Supplemental Responses and Objections to Callwave Communications, LLC's First Interrogatories to Google Regarding the '970 Track filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
February 17, 2016 501 Redaction version of 490 Transcript. (nms)
February 17, 2016 500 Featured Case ORDER Granting (498 in 12-cv-1702-RGA, 485 in 12-cv-1704-RGA, 505 in 12-cv-1701-RGA) MOTION to Redact Transcript of the Hearing Before Special Master Saville on January 8, 2016. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/17/2016. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(nms)
February 17, 2016 499 7.1.1. Statement by CallWave Communications LLC re MOTION to Redact Transcript of the Hearing Before Special Master Saville on January 8, 2016. (McMillan, James) Modified on 2/17/2016 (nms).
February 12, 2016 498 [SEALED] MOTION to Redact Transcript of the Hearing Before Special Master Saville on January 8, 2016 - filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D)(McMillan, James) Modified on 2/16/2016 (nms).
February 11, 2016 CORRECTING ENTRY: The transcript filed at D.I. 498 has been removed from the docket. Counsel has been instructed to contact Chambers. (nms)
February 9, 2016 497 Featured Case FINAL JUDGMENT in favor of Defendants and against Callwave on the claims for infringement of claims 13-17 of the '933 Patent (see Judgment for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/9/2016. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms) Modified on 2/9/2016 (nms).
February 8, 2016 496 PROPOSED Final Judgment, by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James) Modified on 2/9/2016 (nms).
February 3, 2016 495 Featured Case ORDER Granting (417 in 12-cv-1702-RGA, 373 in 12-cv-1704-RGA, 237 in 12-cv-1788-RGA, 308 in 12-cv-1703-RGA, 394 in 12-cv-1701-RGA) MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b). Plaintiff is DIRECTED to submit within five days a jointly agreed order to accomplish the above (see Order for details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/3/2016. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
January 29, 2016 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re (278 in 13-cv-711-RGA, 494 in 12-cv-1702-RGA, 479 in 12-cv-1704-RGA, 499 in 12-cv-1701-RGA) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Submit Joint Status Letter to one week after completion of summary judgment and Daubert motion briefing. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/29/2016. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:13-cv-00711-RGA(nms)
January 29, 2016 494 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Submit Joint Status Letter to one week after completion of summary judgment and Daubert motion briefing - filed by Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul)
January 26, 2016 493 REDACTED VERSION of 489 Appendix, by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-S)(Saindon, Paul) Modified on 1/26/2016 (nms).
January 26, 2016 492 REDACTED VERSION of 488 Response to Objections, by Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul) Modified on 1/26/2016 (nms).
January 26, 2016 491 REQUEST for Oral Argument by CallWave Communications LLC re (263 in 13-cv-711-RGA, 469 in 12-cv-01702-RGA, 470 in 12-cv-1701-RGA, 448 in 12-cv-1704-RGA) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. (McMillan, James) Modified on 1/26/2016 (nms).
January 20, 2016 490 Official Transcript of Special Master Hearing held on 1/8/2016 before Special Master Saville. Court Reporter/Transcriber Wilcox & Fetzer,Telephone number 302-655-0477. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 2/10/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/22/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/19/2016. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(ksr, )
January 19, 2016 489 [SEALED] APPENDIX re Response to Objections, by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Part 2)(Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 1/20/2016 (nms).
January 19, 2016 488 [SEALED] Response To Objections, by Google Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 1/20/2016 (nms).
January 18, 2016 487 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Final Invalidity Contentions on the '970 Patent filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
January 12, 2016 486 REDACTED Version of 475 Sealed Appendix, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix)(McMillan, James) Modified on 1/12/2016 (nms).
January 12, 2016 485 REDACTED VERSION of 476 Letter, by Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul) Modified on 1/12/2016 (nms).
January 12, 2016 CORRECTING ENTRY: D.I. 483 has been removed from the docket as it was incorrectly linked to the document it is redacting. Counsel will refile accordingly. (nms)
January 12, 2016 484 REDACTED VERSION of 477 Letter, by Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul) Modified on 1/12/2016 (nms).
January 12, 2016 CORRECTING ENTRY: D.I. 483 has been removed from the docket. Counsel shall refile the redacted filing which shall include a captioned cover page. (nms)
January 11, 2016 482 REDACTED VERSION of 473 Objections, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-B)(McMillan, James) Modified on 1/12/2016 (nms).
January 11, 2016 481 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Collective Reduced Set of Prior Art in the '970 Track filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
January 11, 2016 480 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Second Supplemental Invalidity Contentions on the '970 Patent filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
January 8, 2016 479 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Google's Second Supplemental Invalidity Contentions on the '970 Patent filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
January 8, 2016 478 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Collective and Google Inc.'s, Blackberry's and Verizon's Individual Requests for Admission to Plaintiff Callwave Communications, LLC Relating to the '970 Track filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
January 7, 2016 477 [SEALED] Letter to Special Master Saville from Paul Saindon regarding Response to Callwave's 1/6/16 Letter. (Saindon, Paul)
January 6, 2016 476 [SEALED] Letter to Special Master Saville from Paul Saindon regarding Discovery. (Saindon, Paul)
January 5, 2016 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re (473 in 12-cv-1701-RGA, 472 in 12-cv-1702-RGA, 451 in 12-cv-1704-RGA, 267 in 13-cv-711-RGA) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties to submit a joint status letter to January 29, 2016, filed by Broadsoft Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/4/2016. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:13-cv-00711-RGA(nms)
January 4, 2016 475 [SEALED] APPENDIX B re 473 Objections, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 B Part 1, # 2 B Part 2, # 3 B Part 3, # 4 B Part 4, # 5 B (Part 5 of 10), # 6 B Part 6, # 7 B Part 7, # 8 B Part 8, # 9 B Part 9, # 10 B Part 10, # 11 C Part 1, # 12 C Part 2, # 13 C Part 3, # 14 Certificate of Service)(McMillan, James) Modified on 1/5/2016 (nms).
January 4, 2016 474 APPENDIX A re 473 Objections, by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James) Modified on 1/5/2016 (nms).
January 4, 2016 473 [SEALED] OBJECTIONS by CallWave Communications LLC to 469 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Certificate of Service)(McMillan, James) Modified on 1/5/2016 (nms).
December 30, 2015 472 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties to submit a joint status letter to January 29, 2016 - filed by Google Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
December 29, 2015 471 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Second Supplemental Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
December 23, 2015 470 NOTICE of Withdrawal requesting Clerk to remove Edmond D. Johnson, formerly of Pepper Hamilton LLP as lead counsel. Reason for request: no longer with firm. by CallWave Communications LLC (McMillan, James)
December 17, 2015 469 RULINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master Yvonne Takvorian Saville. Please note that when filing Objections pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b)(2), briefing consists solely of the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages) and the Response to the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages). No further briefing shall be permitted with respect to objections without leave of the Court. Objections to R&R due by 1/4/2016. Signed by Yvonne Takvorian Saville on 12/10/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:13-cv-00711-RGA(ksr, )
December 11, 2015 468 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Fourth Supplemental Responses to Defendants' First Common Set of Interrogatories Relating to the '970 Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
December 8, 2015 467 REDACTED VERSION of 466 Reply Brief, by Broadsoft Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 36-48)(Mayo, Andrew) Modified on 12/8/2015 (nms).
December 4, 2015 CORRECTING ENTRY: The redaction notice filed on 12/4/2015, has been removed as it was entered in error. (nms)
December 1, 2015 466 [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re 457 Cross-MOTION to Strike Testimony of Dr. Lucantoni filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 36 - 48)(Blumenfeld, Jack)
November 30, 2015 465 REDACTED VERSION of 463 Answering Brief in Opposition, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit K, # 3 Exhibit L)(McMillan, James) Modified on 12/1/2015 (nms).
November 23, 2015 464 EXHIBITS re 463 Reply Brief, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits B-E, # 2 Exhibits F-J, # 3 Certificate of Service)(McMillan, James) Modified on 11/24/2015 (nms).
November 23, 2015 463 [SEALED] Reply BRIEF re 446 Motion to Strike Testimony of Dr. Eldering and Associated Document Productions and In Opposition to 457 Cross-Motion to Strike Testimony of Dr. Lucantoni, filed by CallWave Communications LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 12/3/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit K, # 3 Exhibit L, # 4 Certificate of Service)(McMillan, James) Modified on 11/24/2015 (nms). Modified on 11/24/2015 (nms).
November 17, 2015 462 REDACTED VERSION of 458 Declaration of Stephen P. McBride, by Google Inc., Broadsoft Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-35)(Mayo, Andrew) Modified on 11/17/2015 (nms).
November 17, 2015 461 REDACTED VERSION of 457 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Google Inc., Broadsoft Inc.. (Mayo, Andrew) Modified on 11/17/2015 (nms).
November 17, 2015 REDACTION NOTICE: In accordance with section G of the Administrative Procedures Governing Filing and Service by Electronic Means, redacted versions of sealed documents shall be filed electronically within 7 days of the filing of the sealed document. The records of this case do not reflect the filing of redacted versions of DI # 457 and 458 . (nms)
November 6, 2015 460 MULTI MEDIA DOCUMENT (Exhibit to the Memorandum in Opposition to the Motion to Strike), filed by Google Inc., and Broadsoft Inc. in the form of a CD-ROM. Filing related to (450 in 12-cv-1701-RGA, 459 in 12-cv-01702-RGA, 429 in 12-cv-1704-RGA, 254 in 13-cv-711-RGA) Notice of Filing Multi Media Materials. (Media on file in Clerk's Office). Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:13-cv-00711-RGA(nms)
November 6, 2015 CORRECTING ENTRY: The Sealed Notice of Multi-Media filing filed on 11/5/2015, has been unsealed. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:13-cv-00711-RGA(nms)
November 5, 2015 459 NOTICE of filing the following Non-Paper material(s) in multi media format: DVD. Original Non-paper material(s) to be filed with the Clerk's Office. Notice filed by John G. Day on behalf of Broadsoft Inc. (Day, John) Modified on 11/6/2015 (nms).
November 5, 2015 458 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Stephen P. McBride re 457 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Broadsoft Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibits 3-10, # 4 Exhibits 11-20, # 5 Exhibits 21, 22, 23, 25, 26, 27, 28, 29, 30, # 6 Exhibits 31-35)(Day, John) Modified on 11/6/2015 (nms).
November 5, 2015 457 [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 446 Motion to Strike Testimony of Dr. Eldering and Associated Document Productions, filed by Google Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 11/16/2015. (Day, John) Modified on 11/6/2015 (nms).
October 30, 2015 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Nathaniel T. Browand for Google Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(dmp, )
October 30, 2015 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Mark C. Scarsi for Google Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(dmp, )
October 30, 2015 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Dat Nguyen for Google Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(dmp, )
October 30, 2015 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Ashlee Lin for Google Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(dmp, )
October 30, 2015 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Christopher J. Gaspar for Google Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(dmp, )
October 30, 2015 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Philip T. Chen for Google Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(dmp, )
October 30, 2015 456 Featured Case ORDER Regarding Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions due date (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/30/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:13-cv-00711-RGA(nms)
October 30, 2015 455 PROPOSED ORDER regarding Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions, by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Letter)(Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 10/30/2015 (nms).
October 28, 2015 Set Answering Brief Deadline re 454 MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order. Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 11/16/2015. (nms)
October 28, 2015 454 MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order - filed by Broadsoft Inc.. (Day, John) Modified on 10/28/2015 (nms).
October 26, 2015 453 Featured Case ORDER: Referring the motion to strike and motion to expedite to the Special Master. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/23/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:13-cv-00711-RGA(nms)
October 23, 2015 452 REDACTED VERSION of 448 Opening Brief in Support, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-B, # 2 Exhibits D-J, # 3 Exhibits K-T, # 4 Exhibits U-Z, # 5 Exhibits AA-JJ)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/23/2015 (nms).
October 23, 2015 451 REDACTED VERSION of 446 MOTION To Strike Testimony of Dr. Eldering and Associated Document Productions, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 7.1.1 Statement)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/23/2015 (nms).
October 22, 2015 450 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding opposition to Callwave's Motion to Shorten the Briefing Schedule. (Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 10/23/2015 (nms).
October 20, 2015 449 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Motion to Strike Testimony of Dr. Eldering and Associated Document Productions and Memorandum in Support thereof, together with Exhibits A through JJ filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
October 16, 2015 448 [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re 446 Motion To Strike Testimony of Dr. Eldering and Associated Document Productions , filed by CallWave Communications LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 11/2/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit D, # 4 Exhibit E, # 5 Exhibit F, # 6 Exhibit G, # 7 Exhibit H, # 8 Exhibit I, # 9 Exhibit J, # 10 Exhibit K, # 11 Exhibit L, # 12 Exhibit M, # 13 Exhibit N, # 14 Exhibit O, # 15 Exhibit P, # 16 Exhibit Q, # 17 Exhibit R, # 18 Exhibit S, # 19 Exhibit T, # 20 Exhibit U, # 21 Exhibit V, # 22 Exhibit W, # 23 Exhibit X, # 24 Exhibit Y, # 25 Exhibit Z, # 26 Exhibit AA, # 27 Exhibit BB, # 28 Exhibit CC, # 29 Exhibit DD, # 30 Exhibit EE, # 31 Exhibit FF, # 32 Exhibit GG, # 33 Exhibit HH, # 34 Exhibit II, # 35 Exhibit JJ)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/19/2015 (nms).
October 16, 2015 447 MOTION to Expedite Briefing on Motion to Strike - filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 7.1.1 Statement)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/19/2015 (nms).
October 16, 2015 446 [SEALED] MOTION To Strike Testimony of Dr. Eldering and Associated Document Productions - filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 7.1.1 Statement)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/19/2015 (nms).
October 15, 2015 445 Order Setting Rule 16(b) Conference: A Scheduling Conference is set for 10/29/2015, at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/15/2015. (nms)
October 13, 2015 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re (405 in 12-cv-1704-RGA, 239 in 13-cv-711-RGA, 444 in 12-cv-1702-RGA, 425 in 12-cv-1701-RGA) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for expert discovery and dispositive motions to various dates from October 14, 2015 through and including December 7, 2015, filed by CallWave Communications LLC (Reset Deadlines: Daubert/Dispositive Motions due by 11/4/2015) (see Stipulation for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/13/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:13-cv-00711-RGA(nms)
October 9, 2015 444 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for expert discovery and dispositive motions to various dates from October 14, 2015 through and including December 7, 2015 - filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (Johnson, Edmond)
October 6, 2015 443 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding oral argument on CallWave's Motion to Lift the Stay of Proceedings on the '970 Patent scheduled for Friday, October 9, 2015. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
October 5, 2015 442 Supplemental Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Alphabet Inc. for Google Inc. filed by Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul)
September 25, 2015 441 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Reply Expert Report of Dr. Eric Burger Regarding Invalidity of U.S. Patent Nos. 7,397,910, 7,555,110, 8,325,901 and 7,822,188 filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
September 21, 2015 440 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's 1) Reply Expert Report of Dr. David Lucantoni Regarding Dr. Eric Burger's Rebuttal Expert Report Regarding Infringement of U.S. Patent Nos.7,397,910, 7,555,110, 7822,188 and 8,325,901, and 2) Reply Expert Report of Dr. Glenn Reinman Regarding Dr. Eric Burger's Rebuttal Expert Report Regarding Infringement of U.S. Patent Nos.7,397,910, 7,555,110, 7822,188 and 8,325,901 filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
September 15, 2015 439 Featured Case ORDER from Special Master Yvonne Takvorian Saville. Signed by Yvonne Takvorian Saville on 9/10/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(ksr, )
September 15, 2015 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 438 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Mark C. Scarsi, Philip T. Chen, Ashlee Lin, Dat Nguyen, Christopher Gaspar and Nathaniel Browand of MILBANK, TWEED, HADLEY & MCCLOY LLP filed by Google Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/15/2015. (nms)
September 14, 2015 438 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Mark C. Scarsi, Philip T. Chen, Ashlee Lin, Dat Nguyen, Christopher Gaspar and Nathaniel Browand of Milbank, Tweed, Hadley & Mccloy LLP- filed by Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul) Modified on 9/15/2015 (nms).
September 10, 2015 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re (414 in 12-cv-1701-RGA, 437 in 12-cv-1702-RGA, 393 in 12-cv-1704-RGA, 221 in 13-cv-711-RGA) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Reply Expert Reports to September 18, 2015, filed by Broadsoft Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/10/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:13-cv-00711-RGA(nms)
September 10, 2015 437 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Reply Expert Reports to September 18, 2015 - filed by Broadsoft Inc.. (Day, John) Modified on 9/10/2015 (nms).
August 18, 2015 436 Featured Case ORDER from Special Master Yvonne Takvorian Saville.. Signed by Yvonne Takvorian Saville on 8/17/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(ksr, )
August 11, 2015 435 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Expert Report of Dr. Eric Burger Regarding Noninfringement of U.S. Patent Nos. 7,397,910, 7,555,110, 8,325,901 and 7,822,188 and (2) Expert Report Regarding Damages Applicable to Google, Inc. filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
August 10, 2015 434 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) Callwave Communications, LLC's Rebuttal Expert Report of Dr. David Lucantoni Regarding Dr. Eric Burger's Opening Expert Report Regarding the Validity of U.S. Patent Nos. 7,397,910, 7,555,110, 7,822,188 and 8,325,910 submitted on behalf of Google Inc. and 2) Callwave Communications, LLC's Rebuttal Expert Report of Dr. David Lucantoni Regarding Opening Invalidity Expert Report of Dr. Charles A. Eldering submitted on behalf of Google Inc. filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
August 3, 2015 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re (408 in 12-cv-1701-RGA, 209 in 13-cv-711-RGA, 433 in 12-cv-1702-RGA, 387 in 12-cv-1704-RGA) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Exchange Expert Reports and Complete Expert Depositions, filed by Google Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/3/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:13-cv-00711-RGA(nms)
July 31, 2015 433 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Exchange Expert Reports and Complete Expert Depositions to see Stipulation for details - filed by Google Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
July 31, 2015 432 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Callwave Communications, LLC's Third Supplemental Responses to Google Inc.'s First Individual Interrogatories Relating to the Call Processing Track (4) and Plaintiff's Supplemental Responses and Objections to Google Inc.'s First Individual Requests for Admission Relating to the Call Processing Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
July 9, 2015 431 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLCs Notice of Deposition to be taken of Alex Wiesen on July 9, 2015 filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
July 9, 2015 430 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's 1) Expert Report of Philip Green, 2) Expert Report of Dr. David Lucantoni, and 3) Expert Report of Dr. Glenn Reinman filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
July 8, 2015 429 Featured Case SO ORDERED Granting 428 Stipulation of Dismissal, filed by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P. (Sprint Communications Company L.P. and Sprint Spectrum L.P. terminated., Attorney Stephen J. Kraftschik; Kirk R. Ruthenberg; Benjamin J. Schladweiler; Mark L. Hogge and Karen Jacobs terminated). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/8/2015. (nms)
July 8, 2015 428 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Kraftschik, Stephen)
July 7, 2015 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 427 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Thomas F. Fitzpatrick filed by CallWave Communications LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/7/2015. (nms)
July 7, 2015 427 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Thomas F. Fitzpatrick - filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Thomas F. Fitzpatrick)(Johnson, Edmond)
June 29, 2015 426 Featured Case ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master for (391 in 12-cv-1701-RGA, 307 in 12-cv-1703-RGA, 370 in 12-cv-1704-RGA, 414 in 12-cv-1702-RGA). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/29/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(nms)
June 26, 2015 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re (381 in 12-cv-1704-RGA, 425 in 12-cv-1702-RGA, 402 in 12-cv-1701-RGA, 204 in 13-cv-711-RGA) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for expert reports to opening July 2, 2015; rebuttal August 3, 2015; and reply August 31, 2015, filed by Google Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/26/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:13-cv-00711-RGA(nms)
June 26, 2015 425 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for expert reports to opening - July 2, 2015; rebuttal - August 3, 2015; and reply - August 31, 2015 - filed by Google Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
June 22, 2015 424 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendant's Fifth Supplemental Invalidity Contentions and (2) Defendant Google Inc.'s Reduced Set of Prior Art in the Call Processing Track filed by Google Inc..(Blumenfeld, Jack)
June 22, 2015 423 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding entry of Rule 54(b) judgment. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
June 17, 2015 422 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Google Inc.'s Factual Disclosure filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
June 15, 2015 421 Featured Case ORDER Regarding Claim Construction For Call Processing Patents (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/15/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:13-cv-00711-RGA(nms)
June 15, 2015 420 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Second Supplemental Responses to Google Inc.'s First Individual Interrogatories Relating to the Call Processing Track (5-7) filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
June 12, 2015 419 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) Callwave Communications, LLC's Amended Notice of Deposition to be taken of Margaret Johnson on June 19, 2015; and 2) Callwave Communications, LLC's Notice of Deposition to be taken of Defendant Google Inc. on June 19, 2015 filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
June 8, 2015 418 PROPOSED Order regarding Claim Construction for Call Processing Patents, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Johnson, Edmond) Modified on 6/9/2015 (nms).
June 4, 2015 Set Answering Brief Deadline re 417 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) . Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 6/22/2015. (nms)
June 4, 2015 417 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) - filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (Johnson, Edmond)
June 3, 2015 416 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION providing claim construction for the disputed terms found in U.S. Patent No., 7,397,910, 7,555,110, 7,636,428,7,822,188, 8,064,588, 8,325,901, and 8,351,591. Within five days the parties shall submit a proposed order consistent with this Memorandum Opinion suitable for submission to the jury. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/3/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:13-cv-00711-RGA(nms)
June 2, 2015 415 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Identification of the reduced list of Asserted Patents and Claims against Defendant Google Inc. filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
June 1, 2015 414 RULINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master Yvonne Takvorian Saville - Objections to R&R due by 6/25/2015. Signed by Yvonne Takvorian Saville, Special Master on 6/1/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(ksr, )
May 27, 2015 413 Featured Case ORDER Granting 409 Stipulation of Dismissal regarding U.S. Patent No. 6,771,970, filed by CallWave Communications LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/27/2015. (nms)
May 26, 2015 412 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Fourth Supplemental Responses to Defendants' First Common Interrogatories Relating to the Call Processing Track (7) filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
May 26, 2015 411 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Supplemental Responses to Google Inc.'s First Individual Interrogatories Relating to the Call Processing Track (5) filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
May 26, 2015 410 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Supplemental Disclosure of Infringement Contentions Against Google Inc. filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
May 26, 2015 409 STIPULATION of Dismissal, by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James) Modified on 5/27/2015 (nms).
May 22, 2015 408 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Fourth Supplemental Invalidity Contentions filed by Google Inc..(Blumenfeld, Jack)
May 22, 2015 407 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Notice of Deposition to be taken of Margaret Johnson on June 3, 2015 Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30 filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
May 20, 2015 406 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Google Inc.'s Supplemental Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
May 8, 2015 405 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Google Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Callwave Communications, LLC's Third Individual Interrogatories to Google Relating to the Call Processing Track (No. 6) filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
May 8, 2015 404 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Google Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Callwave Communications, LLC's First Individual Requests for Admission to Google Relating to the Call Processing Track (Nos. 1-22) and (2) Google Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Callwave Communications, LLC's First Collective Requests for Admission to All Defendants Relating to the Call Processing Track (Nos. 1-2) filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
May 8, 2015 403 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Amended Subpoena to Wesley Chan c/o Felicis Ventures filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(McMillan, James)
May 4, 2015 401 Featured Case SO ORDERED re (378 in 12-cv-1701-RGA, 353 in 12-cv-1704-RGA, 301 in 12-cv-1703-RGA, 399 in 12-cv-1702-RGA, 235 in 12-cv-1788-RGA) Stipulation and Proposed Order of Non-Infringement, filed by CallWave Communications LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/4/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
May 4, 2015 400 Featured Case SO ORDERED Granting 399 Stipulation and Order To Stay Pending Settlement, filed by CallWave Communications LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/4/2015. (nms)
May 4, 2015 399 STIPULATION and Proposed Order of Non-Infringement, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Johnson, Edmond) Modified on 5/5/2015 (nms).
May 1, 2015 398 STIPULATION that all proceedings as to Sprint are stayed pending finalization of a settlement agreement, by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Jacobs, Karen) Modified on 5/5/2015 (nms).
April 30, 2015 402 Featured Case SO ORDERED re (351 in 12-cv-1704-RGA, 182 in 13-cv-711-RGA, 395 in 12-cv-1702-RGA, 376 in 12-cv-1701-RGA) Stipulation and Order extending deadlines in the Scheduling Order (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/30/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:13-cv-00711-RGA(nms)
April 30, 2015 397 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Sprint's Responses to Plaintiff's First Individual Interrogatories to Sprint Relating to The Call Processing Track (1-4) filed by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P..(Kraftschik, Stephen)
April 30, 2015 396 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Google Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Callwave Communications, LLC's Second Individual Interrogatories to Google Relating to The Call Processing Track (Nos. 2-5) filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
April 30, 2015 395 STIPULATION to amend the scheduling order for call processing track actions by Broadsoft Inc.. (Mayo, Andrew)
April 28, 2015 394 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendants' Third Supplemental Invalidity Contentions and (2) Google Supplemental Privilege Log filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
April 27, 2015 393 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Notice of Deposition to Matt Reilly Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30 filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
April 16, 2015 392 NOTICE of Subpoena upon Cisco Systems, Inc. by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Schladweiler, Benjamin)
April 16, 2015 391 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin J. Schladweiler on behalf of Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P. (Schladweiler, Benjamin)
April 16, 2015 390 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Google Inc.'s First Supplemental Responses and Objections to Callwave Communications, LLC's First Interrogatories to Google Regarding the Call Processing Track (No. 1) filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
April 15, 2015 389 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Sprint's Second Supplemental Responses to Plaintiff's First Collective Interrogatories to Call Processing Track Defendants (1, 3 and 4) filed by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P..(Kraftschik, Stephen)
April 15, 2015 388 REDACTED VERSION of 367 Letter, by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits E1-E5)(Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 4/15/2015 (nms).
April 15, 2015 387 REDACTED VERSION of 362 Appendix, by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A1-A2, # 2 Exhibit B1-B11, # 3 Exhibit C1-C3, # 4 Exhibit D1-D4)(Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 4/15/2015 (nms).
April 15, 2015 386 REDACTED VERSION of 361 Letter, by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 4/15/2015 (nms).
April 15, 2015 385 REDACTED VERSION of 366 Letter, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Johnson, Edmond) Modified on 4/15/2015 (nms).
April 15, 2015 384 Redaction Version of 291 Transcript. (nms)
April 14, 2015 383 REDACTED VERSION of 359 Letter, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B, # 2 Exhibit D, # 3 Exhibit F)(Johnson, Edmond) Modified on 4/15/2015 (nms).
April 14, 2015 382 Featured Case ORDER Appointing Special Master: Yvonne Takvorian Saville appointed (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/14/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA et al.(nms)
April 14, 2015 381 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Google Inc.'s First Supplemental Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's First Collective Interrogatories to the Call Processing Track Defendants (Nos. 3 and 4) filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
April 14, 2015 380 REDACTED VERSION of 357 Reply to Motion, by AT&T Mobility LLC, T-Moblie USA Inc., Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 4/14/2015 (nms).
April 14, 2015 379 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Notice of Deposition to Mayur Kamat filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
April 14, 2015 378 Featured Case ORDER Granting in part MOTION to Seal Confidential Portions of Transcript of Motion to Stay (see D.I. 334 in 12-cv-1701-RGA, D.I. 279 in 12-cv-1703-RGA, D.I. 330 in 12-cv-1702-RGA) (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/14/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA(nms)
April 14, 2015 REDACTION NOTICE: In accordance with section G of the Administrative Procedures Governing Filing and Service by Electronic Means, redacted versions of sealed documents shall be filed electronically within 7 days of the filing of the sealed document. The records of this case do not reflect the filing of a redacted version of DI # 357 . (nms)
April 13, 2015 377 Proposed Order for Motion to Seal Confidential Portions of Transcript, by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 4/14/2015 (nms).
April 13, 2015 376 Featured Case ORDER REFERRING CASES to Clerk for assignment of a Special Master. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/13/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA et al.(nms)
April 10, 2015 375 Official Transcript of Discovery Dispute held on 04-09-15 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leonard A. Dibbs. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/1/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/11/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/9/2015. (lad)
April 9, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Andrews - Discovery Conference held on 4/9/2015. (Court Reporter Leonard Dibbs.) (ksr, )
April 9, 2015 374 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Edmond D. Johnson, Esq. regarding response to the April 8th letters sent by Google and Broadsoft - re 368 Letter, 369 Letter. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Johnson, Edmond)
April 8, 2015 373 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) Plaintiff's First Individual Requests for Admission to Google Inc. (1-22); and 2) Plaintiff's Third Individual Interrogatories to Google Inc. Relating to the Call Processing Track (6) filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
April 8, 2015 372 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's First Collective Requests for Admission to all Defendants Relating to the Call Processing Track (1-2) filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
April 8, 2015 371 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) Plaintiff's First Individual Requests for Admission to Sprint Spectrum L.P., and Sprint Communications Company L.P. Regarding the Call Processing Track (1-5); 2) Plaintiff's First Collective Requests for Admission to all Defendants Relating to the Call Processing Track (1-2); and 3) Plaintiff's Second Individual Interrogatories to Sprint Spectrum L.P., and Sprint Communications Company L.P. Relating to the Call Processing Track (5). filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
April 8, 2015 370 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Notice of Service of Subpoena to Microsoft Corporation filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(McMillan, James)
April 8, 2015 369 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from John G. Day regarding April 9, 2015 Discovery Conference and Discovery Dispute. (Day, John)
April 8, 2015 368 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Jack B. Blumenfeld, Esquire regarding April 9, 2015 Discovery Conference and Discovery Dispute - re 361 Letter, 360 Exhibit to a Document, 362 Appendix, 359 Letter,. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
April 8, 2015 367 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Karen Jacobs regarding response to CallWave's April 7 letter - re 359 Letter,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit E1-E5)(Jacobs, Karen) Modified on 4/8/2015 (nms).
April 8, 2015 366 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Edmond D.Johnson regarding Callwave's Response to Sprint's Letter dated April 7, 2015 - re 361 Letter. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Johnson, Edmond)
April 8, 2015 365 Featured Case ORAL ORDER: The moving party to the application to Seal Confidential Portions of Transcript of Motion to Stay Heard on February 10, 2015 (see 334 in 12-cv-1701-RGA, 279 in 12-cv-1703-RGA, 330 in 12-cv-1702-RGA) shall within 3 days of the date of this Order submit a revised proposed order that specifies the pages and lines of the requested redactions so that the Order will speak for itself as to what is redacted. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/8/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA(nms)
April 7, 2015 364 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Second Supplemental Invalidity Contentions filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
April 7, 2015 363 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Sprint Nextel Corp.'s Second Set of Individual Interrogatories to Callwave Communications, LLC Relating to the Call Processing Track (No. 4) filed by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P..(Dellinger, Megan)
April 7, 2015 362 [SEALED] APPENDIX re 361 Letter, by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A1-A2, # 2 Exhibits B1-B11, # 3 Exhibits C1-C3, # 4 Exhibits D1-D4)(Jacobs, Karen) Modified on 4/7/2015 (nms).
April 7, 2015 361 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Karen Jacobs, Esquire regarding Discovery Dispute. (Jacobs, Karen)
April 7, 2015 360 EXHIBITS to 359 Letter, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit C, # 3 Exhibit E)(Johnson, Edmond) Modified on 4/7/2015 (nms).
April 7, 2015 359 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Edmond D. Johnson regarding discovery disputes with Sprint Spectrum L.P. and Sprint Communications Company L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B, # 2 Exhibit D, # 3 Exhibit F)(Johnson, Edmond) Modified on 4/7/2015 (nms).
April 6, 2015 358 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Google Inc.'s First Individual Interrogatories to Plaintiff Callwave Communications, LLC relationg to the Call Processing Track (Nos. 1-9) and (2) Google Inc.'s First Individual Requests for Admission to Plaintiff filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
April 2, 2015 357 [SEALED] REPLY to 330 MOTION to Seal Confidential Portions of Transcript of Motion to Stay Heard on February 10, 2015, filed by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 4/6/2015 (nms).
April 2, 2015 356 REDACTED VERSION of 345 Response to Motion, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Johnson, Edmond) Modified on 4/2/2015 (nms).
April 2, 2015 355 Featured Case ORAL ORDER: The parties have advised that a dispute has arisen requiring judicial attention. The Court will hold a discovery conference on 4/9/2015, at 3:00 PM in Chambers before Judge Richard G. Andrews to take up this issue. In preparation for this hearing the parties shall file the Discovery Matters and Disputes procedure as set forth in the Scheduling Order. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/2/2015. (nms)
April 2, 2015 CORRECTING ENTRY: The redaction filed at D.I. 355 has been removed from the docket. Counsel shall refile this document and link it to the sealed filing it relates to. (nms)
April 2, 2015 REDACTION NOTICE: In accordance with section G of the Administrative Procedures Governing Filing and Service by Electronic Means, redacted versions of sealed documents shall be filed electronically within 7 days of the filing of the sealed document. The records of this case do not reflect the filing of a redacted version of DI # 345 . (nms)
March 30, 2015 354 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Google Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Callwave Communications, LLC's Fourth Requests for Production to Google Related to the Call Processing Track (Nos. 24-37) filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
March 30, 2015 353 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Sprint's Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Requests for Production to Sprint Related to the Call Processing Track (1-14) filed by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P..(Kraftschik, Stephen)
March 30, 2015 352 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's First Individual Interrogatories to Sprint Spectrum L.P. and Sprint Communications Company L.P. Relating to the Call Processing Track (1-4) filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
March 30, 2015 351 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Second Individual Interrogatories to Google Inc. Relating to the Call Processing Track (2-5) filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
March 27, 2015 350 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Non-Party Callwave Telecom, Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Defendants' Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information, or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
March 27, 2015 349 NOTICE of Subpoenas by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 3/31/2015 (nms).
March 25, 2015 348 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Responses and Objections to Defendants' Notice of Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition to Callwave Communications, LLC Related to the Call Processing Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
March 25, 2015 347 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Callwave Communications, LLC's Notice of Deposition to James Maccoun Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30 filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
March 24, 2015 346 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Callwave Communications, LLC's Sealed Response To Defendants AT&T Mobility LLC, T-Mobile USA, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P., And Sprint Communications Company L.P.'s Motion To Seal Confidential Portions Of Transcript Of Motion To Stay Heard On February 10, 2015, and Exhibits A and B, by CallWave Communications LLC (Johnson, Edmond) Modified on 3/24/2015 (nms).
March 24, 2015 CORRECTING ENTRY: The Certificate of Service filed at D.I. 346 has been removed from the docket. Counsel shall re-file this document which shall include the appropriate caption with the party names and case number. (nms)
March 23, 2015 345 [SEALED] RESPONSE to 330 MOTION to Seal Portions of Transcript of Motion to Stay Heard on February 10, 2015, filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Johnson, Edmond) Modified on 3/23/2015 (nms).
March 20, 2015 344 REDACTED VERSION of 336 Letter, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit F, # 5 Certificate of Service)(Johnson, Edmond) Modified on 3/23/2015 (nms).
March 20, 2015 343 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Objections and Responses to Defendants' Notice of Deposition of Non-Party Richard Sanders filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
March 19, 2015 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re (288 in 12-cv-1703-RGA, 323 in 12-cv-1704-RGA, 346 in 12-cv-1701-RGA, 166 in 13-cv-711-RGA, 227 in 12-cv-1788-RGA, 342 in 12-cv-1702-RGA) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Megan E. Lantto filed by CallWave Communications LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/19/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA et al.(nms)
March 19, 2015 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re (226 in 12-cv-1788-RGA, 287 in 12-cv-1703-RGA, 322 in 12-cv-1704-RGA, 341 in 12-cv-1702-RGA, 345 in 12-cv-1701-RGA, 165 in 13-cv-711-RGA) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Bryana T. McGillycuddy, filed by CallWave Communications LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/19/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA et al.(nms)
March 19, 2015 342 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Megan E. Lantto - filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James)
March 19, 2015 341 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Bryana T. McGillycuddy - filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James)
March 19, 2015 340 REDACTED VERSION of 333 Letter, by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 3/19/2015 (nms).
March 18, 2015 339 Featured Case ORAL ORDER: The Motions for Judgment on the Pleadings of the '970 Patent (D.I. 257 and 281 in 12cv1701-RGA, 251 and 277 in 12cv1702-RGA, 213 and 237 in 12cv1703-RGA, and 234 and 262 in 12cv1704-RGA) are Dismissed with Leave To Renew upon the expiration of the Stay regarding the '970 Patent. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/18/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(nms)
March 18, 2015 338 Featured Case MEMORANDUM ORDER Granting (228 in 12-cv-1701-RGA, 166 in 12-cv-1788-RGA, 207 in 12-cv-1704-RGA, 193 in 12-cv-1703-RGA, 223 in 12-cv-1702-RGA) Renewed Motion to Stay Proceedings on the '970 Patent Pending Inter Partes Review. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/18/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
March 13, 2015 337 EXHIBITS D and E to Letter dated 3/13/2014, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Johnson, Edmond) Modified on 3/13/2015 (nms).
March 13, 2015 336 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Edmond D. Johnson regarding Response to Karen Jacobs' Letter of March 11, 2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit F, # 5 Certificate of Service)(Johnson, Edmond)
March 13, 2015 335 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) Objections and Responses to Defendants' Notice of Deposition of Non-Party Mark Stubbs; 2) Non-Party Ritesh Bansal's Objections and Responses to Defendants' Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information or Objects, or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action; and 3) Non-Party Mark Stubb's Objections and Responses to Defendants' Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information or Objects, or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
March 12, 2015 334 REDACTED VERSION of 330 MOTION to Seal Confidential Portions of Transcript of Motion to Stay Heard on February 10, 2015, by AT&T Mobility LLC, T-Moblie USA Inc., Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-E)(Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 3/13/2015 (nms).
March 11, 2015 333 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Karen Jacobs regarding status report. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Jacobs, Karen) Modified on 3/11/2015 (nms).
March 9, 2015 332 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) Non-Party James C. Otteson's Objections and Responses to Defendants' Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information or Objects, or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action; 2) Non-Party Michael Buday's Objections and Responses to Defendants' Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information or Objects, or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action; 3) Non-Party David Weiss's Objections and Responses to Defendants' Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information or Objects, or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action; 4) Objections and Responses to Defendants' Notice of Deposition of Non-Party David Weiss; 5) Non-Party Jeffrey Calvins's Objections and Responses to Defendants' Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information or Objects, or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action; 6) Objections and Responses to Defendants' Notice of Deposition of Non-Party Jeffrey Cavins; and 7) Non-Party David Giannini's Objections and Responses to Defendants' Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information or Objects, or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action. filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
March 6, 2015 331 NOTICE of Subpoena to CallWave Telecom, Inc. by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 3/6/2015 (nms).
March 4, 2015 Set Answering Brief Deadline re (334 in 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 279 in 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 330 in 1:12-cv-01702-RGA) MOTION to Seal Confidential Portions of Transcript of Motion to Stay Heard on February 10, 2015. Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 3/23/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA(nms)
March 4, 2015 330 [SEALED] MOTION to Seal Confidential Portions of Transcript of Motion to Stay Heard on February 10, 2015 - filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, T-Moblie USA Inc., Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 3/6/2015 (nms).
March 4, 2015 329 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Stephen J. Kraftschik, Esq. regarding AT&T, Sprint Spectrum, Sprint Communications, T-Mobile USA and Verizon Joinder to Google's Request for Oral Argument. (Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 3/4/2015 (nms).
March 4, 2015 328 Featured Case ORDER regarding CallWave's request for AT&T's indemnification documents that were withheld for privilege. CallWave's request for these documents is DENIED. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/4/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA(nms)
March 3, 2015 327 NOTICE of Subpoena on Cisco Systems, Inc. by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Saindon, Paul)
March 3, 2015 326 REDACTED VERSION of 315 Letter, by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-C)(Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 3/4/2015 (nms).
March 2, 2015 325 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding Request for Oral Argument. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
March 2, 2015 324 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Edmond D. Johnson regarding response to Karen Jacobs' February 24, 2015 Letter. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-C, # 2 Exhibit D, # 3 Exhibit E)(McMillan, James) Modified on 3/3/2015 (nms).
February 27, 2015 323 REPLY BRIEF re 277 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings for Invalidation of the Asserted Claims of the '970 Patent, filed by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 3/3/2015 (nms).
February 26, 2015 322 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Sprint Spectrum L.P. and Sprint Communications Company L.P's Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's Second Individual Interrogatories to Sprint Relating to the '970 Track (2-3) and (2) Sprint Spectrum L.P. and Sprint Communications Company L.P's Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's Second Requests for Production to Sprint Related to the '970 Track (2-11) filed by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P..(Kraftschik, Stephen)
February 26, 2015 321 NOTICE of Amended Subpoenas to Ritesh Bansal, Gerald Hosier, Robert Pedersen and Mark Stubbs by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-5)(Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 3/3/2015 (nms).
February 26, 2015 320 Official Transcript of Discovery Dispute held on 02-25-15 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leonard A. Dibbs. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/19/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/30/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/27/2015. (lad)
February 26, 2015 319 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Objections and Responses to Defendants Sprint Spectrum L.P. and Sprint Communications Company L.P.'s Second Set of Individual Interrogatories to Plaintiff Relating to the '970 Track (Nos. 4-8) filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
February 25, 2015 318 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Fourth Requests for Production to Google Inc. Related to the Call Processing Track (24-37) filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
February 25, 2015 317 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's First Requests for Production to Sprint Spectrum L.P. and Sprint Communications Company L.P. Related to the Call Processing Track (1-14) filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
February 25, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Andrews - Discovery Conference was held on 2/25/2015. (Court Reporter Leonard Dibbs.) Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA(nms)
February 24, 2015 316 NOTICE of Subpoena by Google Inc. (Saindon, Paul)
February 24, 2015 315 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Karen Jacobs regarding Status Report. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-C)(Jacobs, Karen)
February 24, 2015 314 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Responses and Objections to Google's First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff Callwave Communications, LLC Relating to the '970 Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
February 23, 2015 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re (318 in 12-cv-01701-RGA, 267 in 12-cv-01703-RGA, 215 in 12-cv-01788-RGA, 293 in 12-cv-01704-RGA, 313 in 12-cv-01702-RGA) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME regarding Scheduling Order for the '970 Track to (see Stipulation), filed by Google Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/23/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
February 20, 2015 313 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME regarding Scheduling Order for the '970 Track to (see Stipulation) - filed by Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul)
February 20, 2015 312 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Google Inc.'s Responses and Objections to CallWave Communications, LLC's Third Requests for Production to Google Related to the Call Processing Track (20-23) filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
February 20, 2015 311 NOTICE of Subpoenas to Ritesh Bansal, Michael Buday, Jeffrey Cavins, David Giannini, Gerald Hosier, James Otteson, Robert Pedersen, Mark Stubbs and David Weiss, by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-12)(Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 2/23/2015 (nms).
February 20, 2015 310 REDACTED VERSION of 296 Letter, by AT&T Mobility LLC, T-Moblie USA Inc., Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits G-Q)(Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 2/20/2015 (nms).
February 19, 2015 309 REDACTED VERSION of 292 Letter by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit F)(Johnson, Edmond)
February 19, 2015 308 Featured Case ORDER ruling on one of the pending discovery disputes (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/19/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA(nms)
February 19, 2015 307 Featured Case ORAL ORDER: Due to inclement weather the Discovery Conference set for 2/17/2015, was not able to proceed. The Court will now reschedule the Discovery Conference for 2/25/2015, at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/19/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA(nms)
February 17, 2015 306 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Richard Sanders on April 20, 2015 filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
February 17, 2015 305 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Callwave Communications, LLC on April 9, 2015 filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Saindon, Paul)
February 17, 2015 304 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Callwave Communications, LLC on April 9, 2015 filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Saindon, Paul)
February 17, 2015 303 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Richard Sanders on March 16, 2015 filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
February 17, 2015 302 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Callwave Communications, LLC on March 20, 2015 filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Saindon, Paul)
February 17, 2015 301 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Karen Jacobs regarding IPR Statistics. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-C)(Jacobs, Karen)
February 17, 2015 300 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Edmond D. Johnson regarding Court's Request on February 10, 2015 re IPR Statistics. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Johnson, Edmond)
February 17, 2015 299 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 277 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings for Invalidation of the Asserted Claims of the '970 Patent filed by CallWave Communications LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 2/27/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Johnson, Edmond)
February 17, 2015 298 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Edmond D. Johnson, Esq. regarding Request for Oral Argument. (Johnson, Edmond) Modified on 2/18/2015 (nms).
February 17, 2015 297 REDACTED VERSION of 289 Letter, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-I)(Johnson, Edmond) Modified on 2/18/2015 (nms).
February 13, 2015 296 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Karen Jacobs, Benjamin J. Schladweiler and Ryan P. Newell regarding response to CallWave's February 12, 2015 Letter Brief - re (251 in 1:12-cv-01703-RGA) Letter. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit G-Q)(Jacobs, Karen)
February 12, 2015 295 REPLY BRIEF re 251 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings for Invalidation of the Asserted Claims of the '970 Patent filed by Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul)
February 12, 2015 294 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Callwave's Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews filed under seal, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Johnson, Edmond) Modified on 2/12/2015 (nms).
February 12, 2015 293 EXHIBITS to 292 Letter, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Johnson, Edmond) Modified on 2/12/2015 (nms).
February 12, 2015 292 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Edmond D. Johnson regarding February 17, 2015 discovery conference. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit F)(Johnson, Edmond) Modified on 2/12/2015 (nms).
February 11, 2015 291 Official Transcript of Motion to Stay held on 02-10-15 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leonard A. Dibbs. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/4/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/16/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/12/2015. (lad)
February 10, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Andrews - Oral Argument held on 2/10/2015. (Court Reporter Leonard Dibbs.) Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(ksr, )
February 9, 2015 290 EXHIBIT J to 289 Letter, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Johnson, Edmond) Modified on 2/9/2015 (nms).
February 9, 2015 289 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Edmond D. Johnson regarding response to the Defendants' February 6, 2015 Letter regarding response to the Court's January 28, 2015 Oral Order. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibits D through I, # 5 Certificate of Service)(Johnson, Edmond)
February 6, 2015 288 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Sprint's Objections to Plaintiff Callwave Communications, LLC's Notice of Deposition to Defendant Sprint Spectrum L.P. and Sprint Communications Company L.P. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) [Call Processing Track] filed by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P..(Kraftschik, Stephen)
February 6, 2015 287 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Karen Jacobs regarding response to the Courts January 28, 2015 Oral Order. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-C)(Jacobs, Karen)
February 6, 2015 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re (245 in 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 271 in 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 291 in 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 286 in 1:12-cv-01702-RGA) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Anup K. Misra and Anthony DeMarco Pesce of WINSTON & STRAWN LLP filed by Google Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/6/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(nms)
February 5, 2015 286 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Anup K. Misra and Anthony DeMarco Pesce of WINSTON & STRAWN LLP - filed by Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul)
February 5, 2015 285 Featured Case ORAL ORDER: The parties have advised that a discovery dispute has arisen requiring judicial attention. The Court will hold a Discovery conference on 2/17/2015, at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews, to take up this issue. In preparation for this conference the parties shall follow the Discovery Matters and Disputes procedure as set forth in the Scheduling Order. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/5/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA(nms)
February 2, 2015 284 REDACTED VERSION of 268 Reply Brief, by AT & T Inc., AT & T Mobility LLC, Blackberry Corporation, Blackberry Limited, AT&T Inc., AT&T Mobility LLC, Google Inc., T-Moblie USA Inc., Cellco Partnership, Verizon Services Corp., Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 5-7)(Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 2/3/2015 (nms).
February 2, 2015 283 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 251 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings for Invalidation of the Asserted Claims of the '970 Patent filed by CallWave Communications LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 2/12/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(McMillan, James)
February 2, 2015 282 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Google Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Callwave Communications, LLC's Second Collective Requests for Production to All Defendants Related to the Call Processing Track (No. 27) filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
February 2, 2015 281 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Googles Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Callwave Communications, LLC's Second Collective Requests for Production to All Defendants Related to the '970 Track (No. 27) filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
February 2, 2015 280 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Google Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Callwave Communications, LLC's Second Requests for Production to Google Inc. Related to the '970 Track (Nos. 17) filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
February 2, 2015 279 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Sprint Spectrum L.P. and Sprint Communications Company L.P.'s Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Request for Production to Sprint Related to the '970 Track (No. 1); (2) Sprint Spectrum L.P. and Sprint Communications Company L.P.'s Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's Second Collective Requests for Production to All '970 Defendants (No. 27); and (3) Sprint Spectrum L.P. and Sprint Communications Company L.P.'s Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs Second Collective Requests for Production to All Defendants Related to the Call Processing Track (No. 27) filed by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P..(Kraftschik, Stephen)
January 30, 2015 278 OPENING BRIEF in Support re 277 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings for Invalidation of the Asserted Claims of the '970 Patent filed by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 2/17/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-B)(Kraftschik, Stephen)
January 30, 2015 277 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings for Invalidation of the Asserted Claims of the '970 Patent - filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, T-Moblie USA Inc., Verizon Services Corp., Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Kraftschik, Stephen)
January 28, 2015 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 276 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Juanita DeLoach filed by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/28/2015. (nms)
January 28, 2015 276 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Juanita DeLoach - filed by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Kraftschik, Stephen)
January 28, 2015 275 Request for International Judicial Assistance, Pursuant to the Hague Convention on the Taking of Evidence Abroad in Civil or Commercial Matters, to Obtain Evidence From Locationet Systems Ltd.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/28/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
January 28, 2015 274 Request for International Judicial Assistance, Pursuant to the Hague Convention on the Taking of Evidence Abroad in Civil or Commercial Matters, to Obtain Evidence From MPD Technologies Ltd.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/28/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
January 28, 2015 273 Featured Case ORAL ORDER: The Motion to Issue Letters of Request for International Judicial Assistance Pursuant to the Hague Evidence Convention is Granted (see D.I. 211 in 12-cv-01704-RGA, D.I. 196 in 12-cv-01703-RGA, D.I. 169 in 12-cv-01788-RGA, D.I. 232 in 12-cv-01701-RGA, D.I. 227 in 12-cv-01702-RGA). Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/28/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
January 28, 2015 272 Featured Case ORAL ORDER: The Court will hear oral argument on the Renewed Motion to Stay Proceedings on the '970 Patent Pending Inter Partes Review by the Patent Trial and Appeal Board (see D.I. 228 in 12-cv-01701-RGA, D.I. 166 in 12-cv-01788-RGA, D.I. 207 in 12-cv-01704-RGA, D.I. 193 in 12-cv-01703-RGA, D.I. 223 in 12-cv-01702-RGA) on 2/10/2015, at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/28/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
January 28, 2015 271 Featured Case ORAL ORDER: By no later than Feb. 6, 2015, all moving parties for the stay of the '970 track are requested to advise, if the stay were to be granted, whether the party would agree to be bound just as if it were the petitioner for the IPR, which, to the Court's understanding, would mean that the party could not raise any invalidity ground that was, or reasonably could have been, raised in the IPR, that is, section 102 & 103 arguments based on prior art consisting of patents or printed publications. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/28/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
January 27, 2015 270 Official Transcript of Discovery Dispute held on 01-23-15 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leonard A. Dibbs. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/17/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/27/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/27/2015. (lad)
January 26, 2015 269 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Sprint Spectrum L.P. and Sprint Communications Company L.P.'s Second Set of Individual Interrogatories to Plaintiff Relating to the '970 Track (Nos. 4-8) filed by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P..(Kraftschik, Stephen)
January 26, 2015 268 [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re 227 MOTION to Issue Letters of Request for International Judicial Assistance Pursuant to the Hague Evidence Convention filed by Google Inc., Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 5-7)(Kraftschik, Stephen)
January 26, 2015 267 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Google Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Callwave Communications, LLC's Second Requests for Production Related to the Call Processing Track (12-19) filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
January 23, 2015 266 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) Plaintiff's Second Individual Interrogatories to Sprint Spectrum L.P. and Sprint Communications Company L.P. Relating to the '970 Track (2-3) and 2) Plaintiff's Second Individual Requests for Production to Sprint Spectrum L.P. and Sprint Communications Company L.P. Related to the '970 Track (2-11) filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
January 23, 2015 265 REDACTED VERSION of 253 Answering Brief in Opposition, by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James) Modified on 1/26/2015 (nms).
January 23, 2015 264 REDACTED VERSION of 246 Exhibit A in support of Declaration, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(McMillan, James) Modified on 1/23/2015 (nms).
January 23, 2015 263 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Google Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff Callwave Communications, LLC Relating to the '970 Track filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
January 23, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Andrews - Discovery Conference held on 1/23/2015. (Court Reporter Leonard Dibbs.) Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(ksr, )
January 23, 2015 REDACTION NOTICE: In accordance with section G of the Administrative Procedures Governing Filing and Service by Electronic Means, redacted versions of sealed documents shall be filed electronically within 7 days of the filing of the sealed document. The records of this case do not reflect the filing of a redacted version of DI # 246 . (nms)
January 22, 2015 262 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Sprint Spectrum L.P. and Sprint Communications Company L.P.'s Objections to Plaintiff's Notice of Deposition Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) ['970 Track] filed by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P..(Kraftschik, Stephen)
January 22, 2015 261 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Edmond D. Johnson regarding fact discovery deadline. (Attachments: # 1 Exhbits A and B)(Johnson, Edmond)
January 21, 2015 CORRECTING ENTRY: The main document pdf for the letter filed on 1/21/2015, has been swapped out with an amended version. The new version removes any reference to C.A. 13-711-RGA. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
January 21, 2015 260 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Karen Jacobs regarding Defendants seek a modest two month extension of the February 25, 2015 fact discovery deadline. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Jacobs, Karen) (Main Document 260 replaced on 1/21/2015) (nms).
January 20, 2015 259 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Google's Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's Rule 30(b)(6) Notice of Deposition and Topics Related to the '970 Track and (2) Google's Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's Rule 30(b)(6) Notice of Deposition and Topics Related to the Call Processing Track filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
January 20, 2015 258 REQUEST for Oral Argument by Blackberry Corporation, Blackberry Limited, AT&T Mobility LLC, T-Moblie USA Inc., Verizon Services Corp., Google Inc., Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P. regarding Renewed Motion to Stay Proceedings on the '970 Patent Pending Inter Partes Review by the Patent Trial and Appeal Board. (Dellinger, Megan) Modified on 1/21/2015 (nms).
January 20, 2015 257 DECLARATION re 256 Reply Brief, by AT & T Inc., AT & T Mobility LLC, Blackberry Corporation, Blackberry Limited, AT&T Mobility LLC, Google Inc., T-Moblie USA Inc., Cellco Partnership, Verizon Services Corp., Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits D & E)(Dellinger, Megan) Modified on 1/21/2015 (nms).
January 20, 2015 256 REPLY BRIEF re 223 Renewed Motion to Stay Proceedings on the '970 Patent Pending Inter Partes Review by the Patent Trial and Appeal Board, filed by Google Inc., Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Dellinger, Megan) Modified on 1/21/2015 (nms).
January 20, 2015 255 REDACTED VERSION of 244 Sealed Answering Brief in Opposition, by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James) Modified on 1/20/2015 (nms).
January 16, 2015 254 EXHIBIT A re 253 Answering Brief in Opposition, by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James) Modified on 1/20/2015 (nms).
January 16, 2015 253 [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 227 MOTION to Issue Letters of Request for International Judicial Assistance Pursuant to the Hague Evidence Convention filed by CallWave Communications LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 1/26/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(McMillan, James)
January 16, 2015 252 OPENING BRIEF in Support re 251 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings for Invalidation of the Asserted Claims of the '970 Patent, filed by Google Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 2/2/2015. (Saindon, Paul) Modified on 1/16/2015 (nms).
January 16, 2015 251 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings for Invalidation of the Asserted Claims of the '970 Patent - filed by Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul) Modified on 1/16/2015 (nms).
January 15, 2015 250 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Third Requests for Production to Google Inc. Related to the Call Processing Track (20-23) filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
January 14, 2015 249 Featured Case ORAL ORDER: The parties have advised that a discovery dispute has arisen requiring judicial attention. The Court will hold a Discovery conference on 1/23/2015, at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews, to take up this issue. In preparation for this conference the parties shall follow the Discovery Matters and Disputes procedure as set forth in the Scheduling Order. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/14/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
January 14, 2015 248 Official Transcript of Markman Hearing held on 01-17-15 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leonard A. Dibbs. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/4/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/17/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/14/2015. (lad)
January 14, 2015 247 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Karen Jacobs regarding Construction of "switched network." (Jacobs, Karen) Modified on 1/15/2015 (nms).
January 13, 2015 246 [SEALED] EXHIBIT A re 245 DECLARATION of Leah R. McCoy, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(McMillan, James) Modified on 1/14/2015 (nms).
January 13, 2015 245 DECLARATION of Leah R. McCoy re 244 Answering Brief in Opposition, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B, # 2 Exhibit C)(McMillan, James) Modified on 1/14/2015 (nms).
January 13, 2015 244 [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 223 Renewed Motion to Stay Proceedings on the '970 Patent Pending Inter Partes Review by the Patent Trial and Appeal Board, filed by CallWave Communications LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 1/23/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(McMillan, James) Modified on 1/13/2015 (nms).
January 13, 2015 243 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Supplemental Invalidity Contentions filed by Broadsoft Inc..(Mayo, Andrew)
January 13, 2015 CORRECTING ENTRY: Exhibit A has been added to D.I. 241 . The exhibit was inadvertently omitted from the initial filing. (nms)
January 12, 2015 242 Letter to Judge Andrews from James G. McMillan, III regarding response to the Court's oral order of January 8 re: construction of "switched network". (McMillan, James)
January 12, 2015 241 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Karen Jacobs regarding response to the Court's oral order of January 8 (D.I. 242 ) re: construction of "switched network." (Jacobs, Karen) Modified on 1/13/2015 (nms). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/13/2015: # 2 Exhibit A) (nms).
January 12, 2015 240 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Karen Jacobs regarding response to CallWave's letter submitted on January 9, 2015 re: outcall. (Jacobs, Karen) Modified on 1/13/2015 (nms).
January 12, 2015 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re (238 in 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 244 in 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 205 in 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 175 in 1:12-cv-01788-RGA, 221 in 1:12-cv-01704-RGA) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to file answering brief in opposition to Renewed Motion to Stay Proceedings on the '970 Patent to January 13, 2015, filed by CallWave Communications LLC (Reset Briefing Schedule: Answering Brief due 1/13/2015). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/12/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
January 9, 2015 239 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding Callwave's Modified Proposal. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
January 9, 2015 238 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Callwave to file its answering brief in opposition to Defendants' Renewed Motion to Stay Proceedings on the '970 Patent to January 13, 2015 - filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (Johnson, Edmond)
January 9, 2015 237 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Edmond D. Johnson regarding Callwave's response to a request for citations made during the claim construction hearing on January 7, 2015. (Johnson, Edmond)
January 8, 2015 236 Featured Case ORAL ORDER: The parties are ordered to submit letters to the Court by the close of business on Monday, January 12, 2015, explaining: (1) whether the switched network in claims 10 and 16 of the 428 patent should have an antecedent basis, and if so, what that antecedent basis is; and (2) how the term switched network in claims 10 and 16 of the 428 patent is different from the term network used in the same claims. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/8/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:13-cv-00711-RGA(nms)
January 7, 2015 235 NOTICE of Subpoenas by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-7)(Kraftschik, Stephen)
January 7, 2015 234 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Notice of Deposition to Defendants Sprint Spectrum L.P. and Sprint Communications Company L.P. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) for the Call Processing Track and the '970 Track will be taken on January 27, 2015 filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
January 6, 2015 233 NOTICE of Subpoena upon Ericsson, Inc. by AT&T Mobility LLC(Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Schladweiler, Benjamin) Modified on 1/7/2015 (nms).
January 6, 2015 232 REDACTED VERSION of 227 MOTION to Issue Letters of Request for International Judicial Assistance Pursuant to the Hague Evidence Convention, by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-4)(Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 1/6/2015 (nms).
January 6, 2015 231 Featured Case ORAL ORDER: Due to a scheduling conflict the Markman Hearing set for 1/7/2015, will now commence at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/6/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA et al.(nms)
January 5, 2015 230 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Notice of Deposition to Defendant Google Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) for the Call Processing Track on January 21, 2015 filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
January 5, 2015 229 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Notice of Deposition to Defendant Google Inc. for the '970 Track on January 22, 2015 filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
January 5, 2015 228 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's First Requests for Production to Sprint Spectrum L.P. and Sprint Communications Company L.P. Related to the '970 Track (1) filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
December 30, 2014 Set Answering Brief Deadline re (211 in 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 196 in 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 169 in 1:12-cv-01788-RGA, 232 in 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 227 in 1:12-cv-01702-RGA) MOTION to Issue Letters of Request for International Judicial Assistance Pursuant to the Hague Evidence Convention. Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 1/16/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
December 30, 2014 227 [SEALED] MOTION to Issue Letters of Request for International Judicial Assistance Pursuant to the Hague Evidence Convention - filed by AT & T Mobility LLC, Blackberry Corporation, Blackberry Limited, Google Inc., T-Moblie USA Inc., Cellco Partnership, Verizon Services Corp., Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-4)(Kraftschik, Stephen)
December 24, 2014 226 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Second Requests for Production to Google Inc. Related to the Call Processing Track (12-19) filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
December 23, 2014 225 DECLARATION of Stephen J. Kraftschik re 223 Renewed Motion to Stay Proceedings on the '970 Patent Pending Inter Partes Review by the Patent Trial and Appeal Board, by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-C)(Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 1/4/2015 (nms).
December 23, 2014 224 OPENING BRIEF in Support re 223 Renewed Motion to Stay Proceedings on the '970 Patent Pending Inter Partes Review by the Patent Trial and Appeal Board, filed by Google Inc., Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 1/9/2015. (Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 1/4/2015 (nms).
December 23, 2014 223 Renewed Motion to Stay Proceedings on the '970 Patent Pending Inter Partes Review by the Patent Trial and Appeal Board - filed by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 1/4/2015 (nms).
December 23, 2014 222 Featured Case ORDER Regarding Claim Construction For US Patents 6,771,970 and 7,907,933. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/23/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
December 22, 2014 221 PROPOSED Claim Construction Order, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A, # 2 Appendix B)(Johnson, Edmond) Modified on 12/23/2014 (nms).
December 22, 2014 220 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Google's Responses to Plaintiff's Second Interrogatories to Google Relating to the '970 Track (Nos. 2-5) and (2) Google's Responses and Objections to Callwave Communications, LLC's First Requests for Production Related to the '970 Track (Nos. 1-16) filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
December 17, 2014 219 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION providing claim construction for the disputed terms. Within five days the parties shall submit a proposed order consistent with this Memorandum Opinion suitable for submission to the jury. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/17/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
December 15, 2014 218 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Google's Responses to Plaintiff's Second Collective Interrogatories to the Call Processing Track Defendants (No. 8) filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
December 15, 2014 217 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Google's Responses to Plaintiff's Second Collective Interrogatories to the '933 Track Defendants (No. 8) and (2) Google's Responses to Plaintiff's Second Collective Interrogatories to the '970 Track Defendants (No. 8) filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
December 15, 2014 216 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Sprints Responses to Plaintiffs Second Collective Interrogatories to 933 Track Defendants (8); (2) Sprints Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs Second Collective Interrogatories to Call Processing Track Defendants (8); and (3) Sprints Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs Second Collective Interrogatories to 970 Track Defendants (8) filed by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P..(Kraftschik, Stephen)
December 12, 2014 215 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove James F. Hurst as co-counsel.. (Saindon, Paul)
December 10, 2014 214 Joint APPENDIX re 213 Joint Claim Construction Brief, by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-2, # 2 Exhibits 3-4, # 3 Exhibits 5-7)(Saindon, Paul) Modified on 12/11/2014 (nms).
December 10, 2014 213 Joint Claim Construction Brief (Call Processing), filed by Google Inc., Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Saindon, Paul) Modified on 12/11/2014 (nms).
December 10, 2014 212 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Disclosure of Updated Infringement Contentions Against Google, Inc. filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
December 5, 2014 Pro Hac Vice Attorney LeinWeih A. Tseng for CallWave Communications LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA et al.(dmp, )
December 3, 2014 211 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Sur-Reply Claim Construction Brief Relating to the Call Processing Patents filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
December 3, 2014 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re (210 in 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 195 in 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 214 in 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 184 in 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 158 in 1:12-cv-01788-RGA, 115 in 1:13-cv-00711-RGA) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney L. Andrew Tseng filed by CallWave Communications LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/3/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA et al.(nms)
December 3, 2014 210 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney L. Andrew Tseng - filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James)
November 24, 2014 209 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Third Supplemental Responses to Defendants' First Common Interrogatories Relating to the Call Processing Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
November 24, 2014 208 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Third Supplemental Responses to Defendants' First Set of Common Interrogatories Relating to the '970 Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
November 24, 2014 207 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Fourth Supplemental Responses to Defendants' First Set of Common Interrogatories Relating to the '933 Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
November 19, 2014 206 Featured Case ORDER Granting Plaintiff Callwave Communications, LLC's Request To Allow An Exception To The Agreed Protective Order. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/19/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA(nms)
November 18, 2014 205 PROPOSED Order Granting Plaintiff Callwave Communications, LLCs Request to Allow an Exception to the Agreed Protective Order, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Johnson, Edmond) Modified on 11/19/2014 (nms).
November 17, 2014 204 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Responsive Claim Construction Brief Relating to the Call Processing Patents filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
November 17, 2014 203 Official Transcript of Teleconference held on 11-14-14 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter/Transcriber Taneha Carroll. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/8/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/18/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/16/2015. (lad)
November 14, 2014 202 Featured Case ORAL ORDER: The Court will hold a Telephone Conference today, 11/14/2014, at 3:00 PM before Judge Richard G. Andrews to take up the issues raised in the letters filed at D.I. 190 in 12-cv-1702-RGA, D.I. 169 in 12-cv-1703-RGA, D.I. 179 in 12-cv-1704-RGA, D.I.192 in 12-cv-1701-RGA, D.I. 170 in 12-cv-1703-RGA, D.I. 192 in 12-cv-1702-RGA, D.I. 194 in 12-cv-1701-RGA. The parties shall mutually coordinate the call to the Court. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/14/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(nms)
November 12, 2014 201 REDACTED VERSION of 192 Letter, by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 11/13/2014 (nms).
November 12, 2014 200 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Second Collective Interrogatories to Call Processing Track Defendants (8) filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
November 12, 2014 199 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Second Collective Interrogatories to '970 Track Defendants (8) filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
November 12, 2014 198 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Second Collective Interrogatories to '933 Track Defendants (8) filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
November 10, 2014 197 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Third Supplemental Responses to Defendants' First Set of Common Interrogatories Relating to the '933 Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
November 10, 2014 196 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Second Supplemental Responses to Defendants' First Set of Common Interrogatories Relating to the '970 Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
November 10, 2014 195 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Second Supplemental Responses to Defendants' First Set of Common Interrogatories Relating to the Call Processing Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
November 6, 2014 194 Official Transcript of Discovery Dispute held on 10-30-14 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leonard A. Dibbs. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/4/2015. (lad)
November 6, 2014 193 Official Transcript of Markman Hearing held on 10-29-14 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leonard A. Dibbs. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/4/2015. (lad)
November 5, 2014 192 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Stephen J. Kraftschik regarding request for an exception to the agreed protective order. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Kraftschik, Stephen)
November 5, 2014 191 Featured Case ORDER Granting in part and Denying in Part (D.I. 108 in 12-cv-01702-RGA, D.I. 107 in 12-cv-01701-RGA, D.I. 101 in 12-cv-01704-RGA) MOTION to Amend Complaint (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/5/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(nms)
November 4, 2014 190 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from James G. McMillan, III regarding request for an exception to the agreed protective order. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(McMillan, James)
November 4, 2014 189 Featured Case ORAL ORDER: The teleconference set for 11/13/14 at 9:00 AM Eastern Time with Judge Thynge is cancelled and will be rescheduled at a later date. Ordered by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 11/4/14. (cak)
October 30, 2014 188 REDACTED VERSION of 180 Appendix, by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 10/31/2014 (nms).
October 30, 2014 187 REDACTED VERSION of 179 Letter, by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 10/31/2014 (nms).
October 30, 2014 186 REDACTED VERSION of 185 Letter, by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 10/31/2014 (nms).
October 30, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Andrews - Discovery Conference held on 10/30/2014. (Court Reporter Leonard Dibbs.) Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA et al.(ksr, )
October 29, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Andrews - Markman Hearing held on 10/29/2014. (Court Reporter Leonard Dibbs.) Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA et al.(ksr, )
October 29, 2014 185 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Karen Jacobs regarding response to CallWave's opening discovery dispute letter. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A & B)(Jacobs, Karen)
October 29, 2014 184 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Paul Saindon regarding response to CallWave's motion to compel. (Saindon, Paul)
October 29, 2014 183 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Edmond D. Johnson regarding Discovery Dispute. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Johnson, Edmond)
October 29, 2014 182 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Edmond D. Johnson regarding Discovery Dispute. (Johnson, Edmond)
October 28, 2014 181 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Edmond D. Johnson regarding Discovery Dispute. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Johnson, Edmond)
October 28, 2014 180 [SEALED] APPENDIX re (103 in 1:13-cv-00711-RGA, 179 in 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 142 in 1:12-cv-01788-RGA, 181 in 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 159 in 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 169 in 1:12-cv-01704-RGA) Letter by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-18)(Jacobs, Karen)
October 28, 2014 179 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Karen Jacobs regarding discovery dispute. (Jacobs, Karen)
October 28, 2014 178 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Paul Saindon regarding discovery dispute. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - 2)(Saindon, Paul)
October 28, 2014 177 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Edmond D. Johnson regarding Discovery Disputes. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Johnson, Edmond) Modified on 10/28/2014 (nms).
October 27, 2014 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re (178 in 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 166 in 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 156 in 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 176 in 1:12-cv-01702-RGA) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney George C. Lombardi filed by Google Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/27/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(nms)
October 24, 2014 176 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney George C. Lombardi - filed by Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul)
October 24, 2014 175 Featured Case ORAL ORDER: The discovery conference set by the Oral Order entered on 10/14/2014, (see 169 in 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 169 in 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 135 in 1:12-cv-01788-RGA, 135 in 1:12-cv-01788-RGA, 157 in 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 157 in 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 97 in 1:13-cv-00711-RGA, 97 in 1:13-cv-00711-RGA) will now commence at 8:30 a.m. in Courtroom 6A. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/24/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA et al.(nms)
October 24, 2014 174 Featured Case ORAL ORDER: The parties have advised that the Google Defendant has a discovery dispute requiring judicial attention. The Court will hold a Discovery conference on 10/30/2014, at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews, to take up this issue. In preparation for this conference the parties shall follow the Discovery Matters and Disputes procedure as set forth in the Scheduling Order. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/24/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(nms)
October 24, 2014 173 Joint Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Paul Saindon on behalf of the parties regarding revised set of joint claim construction charts. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Saindon, Paul) Modified on 10/24/2014 (nms).
October 23, 2014 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Charles F. Koch for CallWave Communications LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00711-RGA et al.(els)
October 21, 2014 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re (172 in 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 162 in 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 152 in 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 174 in 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 138 in 1:12-cv-01788-RGA) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Charles F. Koch filed by CallWave Communications LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/21/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
October 20, 2014 172 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Charles F. Koch - filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (Johnson, Edmond)
October 15, 2014 171 Featured Case ORAL ORDER: The parties have advised that a discovery dispute has arisen requiring judicial attention. The Court will hold a Discovery conference on 10/30/2014, at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews, to take up this issue. In preparation for this conference the parties shall follow the Discovery Matters and Disputes procedure as set forth in the Scheduling Order. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/14/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA(ksr, )
October 14, 2014 170 Joint Appendeix of CLAIM Construction Charts, by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Tabs A-L,Part1, # 2 Tabs A-L,Part2, # 3 Tabs A-L,Part3)(Saindon, Paul) Modified on 10/15/2014 (nms).
October 14, 2014 169 APPENDIX re (D.I. 168 in 12-cv-01702-RGA, D.I. 134 in 12-cv-01788-RGA, D.I. 156 in 12-cv-01704-RGA, D.I. 168 in 12-cv-01701-RGA, D.I. 147 in 12-cv-01703-RGA) Joint Claim Construction Brief, by AT & T Mobility LLC, Blackberry Corporation, Blackberry Limited, AT&T Mobility LLC, Google Inc., T-Moblie USA Inc., Cellco Partnership, Verizon Services Corp., Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-5, Part1, # 2 Exhibits 1-5, Part2, # 3 Exhibits 6-7)(Saindon, Paul) Modified on 10/15/2014 (nms).
October 14, 2014 CORRECTING ENTRY: The exhibits and two declarations attached to the Joint Claim Construction Brief filed on 10/9/2014, have been removed from that filing. Counsel shall refile these documents in a Joint Appendix and link it back to the Joint Brief it is in support of. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
October 9, 2014 168 Joint Claim Construction Brief, filed by Google Inc., Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P..(Saindon, Paul) Modified on 10/14/2014 (nms).
October 8, 2014 167 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Callwave Communications, LLC's Initial Proposed Claim Constructions for the Call Processing Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
October 7, 2014 166 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Initial Proposed Claim Constructions for the Call Processing Track filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
October 6, 2014 165 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Peter Lambrianakos as co-counsel. Reason for request: no longer at Winston & Strawn LLP. (Saindon, Paul)
October 3, 2014 164 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Sprint's First Supplemental Responses to Plaintiffs' First Collective Interrogatories to Call Processing Track Defendants (1-7); (2) Sprint's Second Amended Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures Regarding the '933 Track and the Call Processing Track; (3) Sprint's Amended Paragraph 3 Disclosures Regarding the Call Processing Track; (4) Sprint's Amended Paragraph 3 Disclosures Regarding the '933 Track; (5) Sprint's Amended Paragraph 3 Disclosures Regarding the '970 Track; and (6) Sprint's Amended Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures Regarding the '970 Track filed by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P..(Kraftschik, Stephen)
October 2, 2014 163 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Sur-Reply Claim Construction Brief Relating to the '933 and '970 Patents filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
September 30, 2014 162 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Supplemental Responses to Defendants' First Common Set of Interrogatories Relating to the '970 Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
September 30, 2014 161 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Second Supplemental Responses to Defendants' First Set of Common Interrogatories Relating to the '933 Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
September 26, 2014 160 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Sprint's First Supplemental Responses to Plaintiffs First Collective Interrogatories to '970 Track Defendants (1-7); (2) Sprint's First Supplemental Responses to Plaintiff's First Interrogatories to Sprint Nextel Corp. Relating to the '970 Track (1); (3) Sprint's First Supplemental Responses to Plaintiff's First Collective Interrogatories to '933 Track Defendants (1-7); and (4) Sprint's First Supplemental Responses to Plaintiff's First Interrogatories to Sprint Nextel Corp. Relating to the '933 Track (1) filed by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P..(Kraftschik, Stephen)
September 23, 2014 159 REDACTED VERSION of 155 Letter, by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit E-H)(Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 9/23/2014 (nms).
September 18, 2014 158 Official Transcript of Discovery Dispute held on 09-16-14 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leonard A. Dibbs. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/9/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/20/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/17/2014. (lad)
September 18, 2014 157 Official Transcript of Motion to Stay held on 09-16-14 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leonard A. Dibbs. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/9/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/20/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/17/2014. (lad)
September 16, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Andrews - Discovery Conference held on 9/16/2014. (Court Reporter Leonard Dibbs.) Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA(ksr, )
September 16, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Andrews - Oral Argument held on 9/16/2014. (Court Reporter Leonard Dibbs.) Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(ksr, )
September 16, 2014 156 Featured Case ORAL ORDER: The Motion to Stay Proceedings (D.I. 104 in No. 12-1701; D.I. 103 in No. 12-1702; D.I. 92 in No. 12-1703; D.I. 96 in No. 12-1704; and D.I. 86 in No. 12-1788) is DENIED for the reasons stated in open court. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/16/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(ksr, )
September 15, 2014 155 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Karen Jacobs regarding Discovery disputes - re (134 in 1:12-cv-01703-RGA) Letter. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit E through H)(Jacobs, Karen)
September 12, 2014 154 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Edmond D. Johnson regarding Discovery Dispute. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit D, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Johnson, Edmond)
September 10, 2014 153 Featured Case ORAL ORDER: The parties have advised that discovery disputes have arisen requiring judicial attention. The Court will hold a Discovery Hearing on 9/16/2014, at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews, to take up this issue. In preparation for this conference the parties shall follow the Discovery Matters and Disputes procedure as set forth in the Scheduling Order. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/10/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA et al.(nms)
September 9, 2014 152 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Preliminary List of Claim Terms that Require Construction for the Call Processing Track filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
September 9, 2014 151 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's List of Claim Terms For Which Constructions Will Be Proposed filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
September 5, 2014 150 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) Callwave Communications, LLC's Opening Claim Construction Brief; 2) Declaration of David Kotz, Ph.D.; and 3) Declaration of Jeffrey J. Evans, Ph.D. filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
September 4, 2014 149 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Responses to Defendants' Second Set of Common Interrogatories Relating to the Call Processing Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
September 4, 2014 148 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) Callwave Communications, LLC's Responses to Defendants' Second Set of Common Interrogatories Relating to the '933 Track; and 2) Callwave Communications, LLC's Responses to Defendants' Second Set of Common Interrogatories Relating to the '970 Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
August 27, 2014 147 NOTICE of Subpoena upon David Hofstatter by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Kraftschik, Stephen)
August 21, 2014 146 NOTICE of Subpoenas, by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-6)(Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 8/25/2014 (nms).
August 15, 2014 145 Joint APPENDIX, Vol. II of II re Claim Construction Chart, by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James) Modified on 8/15/2014 (nms).
August 15, 2014 144 Joint APPENDIX, Vol. I of II, re Claim Construction Chart, by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James) Modified on 8/15/2014 (nms).
August 15, 2014 CORRECTING ENTRY: The Joint Appendix entries filed on 8/15/2014, have been removed from the dockets. The filings were not formatted appropriately with proper cover pages providing the case caption and titles (Volumes I and II) for the filings. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
August 14, 2014 143 CLAIM Construction Chart for the '970 Track, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(McMillan, James) Modified on 8/15/2014 (nms).
August 14, 2014 142 CLAIM Construction Chart for '933 Track, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(McMillan, James) Modified on 8/15/2014 (nms).
August 7, 2014 141 Featured Case ORAL ORDER: The Court will hear oral argument on the MOTION to Stay Proceedings on the '970 Patent Pending Inter Partes Review by the Patent Trial and Appeal Board (see D.I. 103 in 12-cv-01702-RGA, D.I. 96 in 12-cv-01704-RGA, D.I. 92 in 12-cv-01703-RGA, D.I. 104 in 12-cv-01701-RGA, D.I. 86 in 12-cv-01788-RGA) on 9/16/2014, at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/7/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
August 6, 2014 140 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Supplemental Responses to Defendants' First Set of Common Interrogatories Relating to the Call Processing Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
August 6, 2014 139 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Supplemental Responses to Defendants' First Set of Common Interrogatories Relating to the '933 Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
August 4, 2014 138 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Second Common Interrogatories to Plaintiff CallWave Communications, LLC Relating to the Call Processing Track (No. 7) filed by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P..(Kraftschik, Stephen)
August 4, 2014 137 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendants' Second Set of Common Interrogatories to Plaintiff Relating to the '933 Track (No. 7); and (2) Defendants' Second Common Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff Relating to the '970 Track (No. 9) filed by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P..(Kraftschik, Stephen)
August 4, 2014 136 Featured Case ORDER Granting (114 in 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 77 in 1:13-cv-00711-RGA, 131 in 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 110 in 1:12-cv-01788-RGA, 124 in 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 132 in 1:12-cv-01701-RGA) Proposed Agreed Protective Order, filed by CallWave Communications LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/4/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA et al.(nms)
August 4, 2014 135 Featured Case SO ORDERED Granting (106 in 1:12-cv-01788-RGA, 127 in 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 111 in 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 120 in 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 74 in 1:13-cv-00711-RGA) Proposed Order Regarding Discovery, Including Discovery of Electronically Stored Information ("ESI"), filed by Google Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/4/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA, 1:13-cv-00711-RGA(nms)
August 1, 2014 134 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) Callwave Communications, LLC's Initial Proposed Claim Constructions for the '970 Track and 2) Callwave Communications, LLC's Initial Proposed Claim Constructions for the '933 Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
July 31, 2014 133 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendants' Initial Proposed Claim Constructions Relating to the '933 Patent; and (2) Defendants' Initial Proposed Claim Constructions Relating to the '970 Patent filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
July 30, 2014 132 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Shailendra K. Maheshwari as co-counsel. Reason for request: no longer associated with case. (Kraftschik, Stephen)
July 28, 2014 131 PROPOSED Stipulated Protective Order, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Johnson, Edmond) Modified on 7/29/2014 (nms).
July 21, 2014 130 REQUEST for Oral Argument by AT & T Mobility LLC, Blackberry Corporation, Blackberry Limited, AT&T Inc., AT&T Mobility LLC, Google Inc., T-Moblie USA Inc., Cellco Partnership, Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P. re 103 MOTION to Stay. (Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 7/22/2014 (nms).
July 17, 2014 129 REPLY BRIEF re 108 MOTION to Amend Complaint filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (Johnson, Edmond)
July 17, 2014 128 Featured Case ORAL ORDER: On the Letter, Exhibit A (see D.I. 70 in 13-cv-00711-RGA, D.I. 104 in 12-cv-01703-RGA, D.I. 112 in 12-cv-01704-RGA, D.I. 119 in 12-cv-01701-RGA, D.I. 119 in 12-cv-01702-RGA, D.I. 98 in 12-cv-01788-RGA), the Court prefers the more narrowly tailored CallWave position. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/17/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA et al.(nms)
July 16, 2014 127 Proposed Order Regarding Discovery, Including Discovery of Electronically Stored Information ("ESI"), by Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul) Modified on 7/17/2014 (nms).
July 15, 2014 126 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Paul Saindon regarding the proposed Protective Order and in response to CallWave's letter dated July 7, 2014. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-2)(Saindon, Paul)
July 14, 2014 125 REPLY BRIEF re 103 MOTION to Stay Proceedings on the '970 Patent Pending Inter Partes Review by the Patent Trial and Appeal Board filed by Google Inc., Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Dellinger, Megan)
July 11, 2014 124 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Callwave Communications, LLC's List of Claim Terms for which Constructions Will Be Proposed filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
July 10, 2014 123 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendants' Preliminary List of Claim Terms that Require Construction and/or are Indefinite for the '933 Track; and (2) Defendants' Preliminary List of Claim Terms that Require Construction and/or are Indefinite for the '970 Track filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
July 10, 2014 122 Official Transcript of Discovery Dispute held on 07-08-14 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leonard A. Dibbs. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/31/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/11/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/8/2014. (lad)
July 8, 2014 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Gregory S. Bishop for CallWave Communications LLC added for electronic noticing. (dmp, )
July 8, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Andrews - Discovery Conference held on 7/8/2014. (Court Reporter Leonard Dibbs.) Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA et al.(ksr, )
July 8, 2014 121 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Lauren Reznick as co-counsel. Reason for request: No longer with the firm.. (McMillan, James)
July 7, 2014 120 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 108 MOTION to Amend Complaint filed by Google Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 7/17/2014. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
July 7, 2014 119 Letter to Honorable Richard G. Andrews from James G. McMillan, III regarding Protective Order. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-B)(McMillan, James) Modified on 7/8/2014 (nms).
July 7, 2014 118 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from James G. McMillan, III regarding CallWave Communications, LLC's Response to Defendants' July 3, 2014 letter. (McMillan, James) Modified on 7/8/2014 (nms).
July 7, 2014 117 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding discovery dispute. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-B)(Blumenfeld, Jack)
July 3, 2014 116 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 103 MOTION to Stay Proceedings on the '970 Patent Pending Inter Partes Review by the Patent Trial and Appeal Board, filed by CallWave Communications LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 7/14/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-E, # 2 Exhibits F-I, # 3 Exhibits J-L, # 4 Certificate of Service)(McMillan, James) Modified on 7/8/2014 (nms).
July 3, 2014 115 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from James G. McMillan, III regarding Discovery Dispute. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-F)(McMillan, James) Modified on 7/8/2014 (nms).
July 3, 2014 114 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding discovery dispute. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
July 1, 2014 113 NOTICE of Subpoena on Vipul Sawhney by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Subpoena)(Saindon, Paul)
June 27, 2014 112 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Preliminary Invalidity Contentions Relating to the Call Processing Track filed by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P..(Tennyson, Eleanor)
June 26, 2014 111 Featured Case ORAL ORDER: The parties have advised that a discovery dispute has arisen requiring judicial attention. The Court will hold a Discovery conference on 7/8/2014, at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews to take up this issue. In preparation for this conference the parties shall follow the Discovery Matters and Disputes procedure as set forth in the Scheduling Order. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/26/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA et al.(nms)
June 20, 2014 110 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Amended Disclosure of Defendant Google Inc. Pursuant to Paragraph 3.A of the Proposed Order Regarding Discovery filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
June 20, 2014 109 NOTICE of Subpoenas on Fuze Box, Inc. and FuzeBox Software Corp. by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-4)(Saindon, Paul)
June 17, 2014 Set Answering Brief Deadline re 108 MOTION to Amend Complaint. Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 7/7/2014. (nms)
June 17, 2014 108 MOTION to Amend Complaint - filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Third Amended Complaint, # 2 Redlined Version, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F)(Johnson, Edmond) Modified on 6/18/2014 (nms).
June 17, 2014 107 Featured Case SO ORDERED Granting 106 Stipulation and Proposed Order to Substitute Party, filed by CallWave Communications LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/17/2014. (nms)
June 17, 2014 106 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order to Substitute Party by CallWave Communications LLC. (Johnson, Edmond)
June 17, 2014 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re (94 in 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 99 in 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 105 in 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 88 in 1:12-cv-01788-RGA, 106 in 1:12-cv-01701-RGA) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Gregory S. Bishop filed by CallWave Communications LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/17/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
June 17, 2014 105 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Gregory S. Bishop - filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Edmond)
June 16, 2014 104 OPENING BRIEF in Support re 103 MOTION to Stay Proceedings on the '970 Patent Pending Inter Partes Review by the Patent Trial and Appeal Board, filed by Google Inc., Sprint Nextel Corp..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 7/3/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-6)(Dellinger, Megan) Modified on 6/17/2014 (nms).
June 16, 2014 103 MOTION to Stay Proceedings on the '970 Patent Pending Inter Partes Review by the Patent Trial and Appeal Board - filed by AT & T Mobility LLC, Blackberry Corporation, Blackberry Limited, AT&T Mobility LLC, Google Inc., T-Moblie USA Inc., Cellco Partnership, Verizon Communications Inc., Sprint Nextel Corp.. (Dellinger, Megan) Modified on 6/17/2014 (nms).
June 10, 2014 102 NOTICE of Subpoenas on Fuze Box, Inc. and FuzeBox Software Corp. by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 & 2)(Saindon, Paul)
May 16, 2014 101 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendants' Initial Invalidity Contentions on the '933 Patent and (2) Defendants' Initial Invalidity Contentions the '970 patent filed by Sprint Nextel Corp..(Kraftschik, Stephen)
May 13, 2014 100 NOTICE Of Service of Callwave Communications, LLC's Subpoena to Amdocs, Inc. and Danal Inc., d/b/a Billtomobile, filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(McMillan, James) Modified on 5/14/2014 (nms).
May 12, 2014 99 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) CallWave Communications, LLC's Disclosure of Infringement Contentions against Google, Inc. regarding the Call Processing Track and 2) CallWave Communications, LLC's Corrected Disclosure of Infringement Contentions against Google, Inc. regarding the Call Processing Track in C.A. No. 12-1701-RGA and C.A. No. 12-1704 filed by CallWave Communications LLC filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
May 12, 2014 98 NOTICE OF SERVICE of CallWave Communications, LLC's Disclosure of Infringement Contentions against Sprint Nextel Corp. regarding the Call Processing Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
May 8, 2014 97 NOTICE OF SERVICE of CallWave Communications, LLC's Responses to Google's First Set of Requests for Production to Plaintiff Relating to the Call Processing Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
May 8, 2014 96 NOTICE OF SERVICE of CallWave Communications, LLC's Responses to Google's First Set of Requests for Production to Plaintiff Relating to the '933 Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
April 24, 2014 95 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Benjamin Snitkoff as co-counsel. Reason for request: no longer with the firm. (Johnson, Edmond)
April 15, 2014 94 NOTICE OF SERVICE of CallWave Communications, LLC's Disclosures of Infringement Contentions Relating to the '933 Track and '970 Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
April 9, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Andrews - Discovery Conference held on 4/9/2014. (Court Reporter Heather Triozzi - Hawkins Reporting Service.) Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA et al.(ksr, )
April 8, 2014 93 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from James G. McMillan, III regarding Discovery Dispute - re (84 in 1:12-cv-01703-RGA) Letter. (McMillan, James)
April 7, 2014 92 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Paul Saindon regarding Protective Order and ESI Order Disputes. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-10)(Saindon, Paul)
April 4, 2014 91 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Sprint's Rule 26(a)(1) First Amended Initial Disclosures Regarding the '933 Track and the Call Processing Track filed by Sprint Nextel Corp..(Tennyson, Eleanor)
April 4, 2014 90 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) CallWave Communications, LLC's Responses to Sprint Nextel Corp.'s Individual Interrogatories Relating to the '970 Track (Nos. 1-3); 2) CallWave Communications, LLC's Responses to Sprint Nextel Corp.'s Individual Interrogatories Relating to the Call Processing Track (Nos. 1-3); 3) CallWave Communications, LLC's Responses to Sprint Nextel Corp.'s Individual Interrogatories Relating to the '933 Track (Nos. 1-3); 4) CallWave Communications, LLC's Objections and Responses to Defendant Sprint Nextel Corp.'s First Set of Requests for Production Relating to the '933 Track (Nos. 1-79); 5) Responses to Defendant Sprint Nextel Corp's First Set of Requests for Production to Plaintiff Relating to the '970 Track (1-79); and 6) Responses to Defendant Sprint Nextel Corp's First Set of Requests for Production to Plaintiff Relating to the Call Processing Track (1-79) filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
April 4, 2014 89 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) CallWave Communications, LLC's Responses to Defendants' First Common Set of Interrogatories Relating to the '970 Track; and 2) CallWave Communications, LLC's Responses to Defendants' First Set of Common Interrogatories Relating to the '933 Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
April 4, 2014 88 NOTICE OF SERVICE of CallWave Communications, LLC's Responses to Defendants' First Common Interrogatories Relating to the Call Processing Track (Nos. 1-6) filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
April 3, 2014 87 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Google's First Set of Requests for Production to Plaintiff Relating to the '933 Track filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
April 3, 2014 86 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Google's First Requests for Production to Plaintiff Relating to the Call Processing Track filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
April 3, 2014 85 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Google's First Set of Requests for Production to Plaintiff Relating to the '970 Track filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
April 1, 2014 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Leah R. McCoy,Suparna Datta for CallWave Communications LLC added for electronic noticing. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA et al.(dmp, )
March 28, 2014 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 84 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Suparna Datta filed by CallWave Communications LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/28/2014. (nms)
March 27, 2014 84 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Suparna Datta - filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McMillan, James)
March 25, 2014 83 NOTICE OF SERVICE of CallWave Communications, LLC's Disclosure Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Default Discovery Standard filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
March 24, 2014 82 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Disclosure of Defendant Google Inc. Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Delaware Default Standard for Discovery and Paragraph 3 of the Proposed Order Regarding Discovery, Including Discovery of Electronically Stored Information filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
March 24, 2014 81 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Sprint's Paragraph 3 Disclosures Regarding the '933 Track; (2) Sprint's Paragraph 3 Disclosures Regarding the Call Processing Track; and (3) Sprint's Paragraph 3 Disclosures Regarding the '970 Track filed by Sprint Nextel Corp..(Kraftschik, Stephen)
March 21, 2014 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 80 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Leah R. McCoy filed by CallWave Communications LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/21/2014. (nms)
March 21, 2014 80 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Leah R. McCoy - filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McMillan, James)
March 20, 2014 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Christopher Boundy for CallWave Communications LLC added for electronic noticing. (dmp, )
March 13, 2014 Featured Case ORAL ORDER: The parties have advised that a discovery dispute has arisen requiring judicial attention. The Court will hold a Discovery conference on 4/9/2014, at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews, to take up this issue. In preparation for this conference the parties shall follow the Discovery Matters and Disputes procedure as set forth in the Scheduling Order.. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/13/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA et al.(ksr, )
March 10, 2014 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 79 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christopher Boundy filed by CallWave Communications LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/10/2014. (nms)
March 10, 2014 79 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christopher Boundy - filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certification by Christopher Boundy, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(McMillan, James)
March 6, 2014 78 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1. Sprint Nextel Corp.'s Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Collective Interrogatories to '933 Track Defendants (1-7); 2. Sprint's Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Interrogatories to Sprint Nextel Corp. Relating to the '933 Track (1); 3. Sprint Nextel Corporation's Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Collective Requests for Production to All Defendants Related to the '933 Track (1-26); 4. Sprint Nextel Corporation's Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Collective Interrogatories to Call Processing Track Defendants (1-7); 5. Sprint Nextel Corporation's Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Collective Requests for Production to All Defendants Related to the Call Processing Track (1-26); 6. Sprint Nextel Corp.'s Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Collective Interrogatories to '970 Track Defendants (Nos. 1-7); 7. Sprint Nextel Corporation's Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Interrogatories to Sprint Nextel Corp. Relating to the '970 Track (1); and 8. Sprint Nextel Corporation's Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Collective Requests for Production to All '970 Defendants (1-26) filed by Sprint Nextel Corp..(Kraftschik, Stephen)
February 28, 2014 77 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) Sprint Nextel Corp.'s First Set of Individual Interrogatories to Callwave Communications, LLC Relating to the '970 Track (Nos. 1-3); 2) Sprint Nextel Corp.'s First Set of Individual Interrogatories to Callwave Communications, LLC Relating to the '933 Track (Nos. 1-3); 3) Sprint Nextel Corp.'s First Set of Individual Interrogatories to CallWave Communications, LLC Relating to the Call Processing Track (Nos. 1-3); 4) Sprint Nextel Corp.'s First Set of Requests for Production to Plaintiff Relating to the Call Processing Track (Nos. 1-79); 5) Defendant Sprint Nextel Corporation's First Set of Requests for Production to Plaintiff Relating to the '970 Track (1-79); and 6) Defendant Sprint Nextel Corporation's First Set of Requests for Production to Plaintiff Relating to the '933 Track (1-79) filed by Sprint Nextel Corp..(Kraftschik, Stephen)
February 28, 2014 76 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' First Set of Common Interrogatories to Plaintiff Relating to the '970 Track filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
February 28, 2014 75 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' First Common Interrogatories to Plaintiff CallWave Communications, LLC Relating to the Call Processing Track filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
February 28, 2014 74 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' First Set of Common Interrogatories to Plaintiff Relating to the '933 Track filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
February 28, 2014 73 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Google's Responses to Plaintiff's First Requests for Production to Google Related to the Call Processing Track (1-11); (2) Google Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Callwave Communications, LLC's First Collective Requests for Production to all Defendants Related to the '933 Track (1-26); (3) Google Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Callwave Communications, LLC's First Collective Requests for Production to All Defendants Related to the '970 Track (1-26); (4) Google Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Callwave Communications, LLC's First Collective Requests for Production to all Defendants Related to the Call processing Track (1-26); (5) Google's Response to Plaintiff's First Interrogatories to Google Regarding the '933 Track (1); (6) Google Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Callwave Communications, LLC's First Interrogatories to Google Regarding the '970 Track (1); (7) Google Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Callwave Communications, LLC's First Interrogatories to Google Regarding the Call Processing Track (1); (8) Google's Response to Plaintiff's First Collective Interrogatories to the '933 Track Defendants (1-7); (9) Google's Responses to Plaintiff's First Collective Interrogatories to the '970 Track Defendants (1-7); and (10) Google's Responses to Plaintiff's First Collective Interrogatories to the Call Processing Track Defendants (1-7) filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
February 25, 2014 72 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Sprint Corporation, Other Affiliate SoftBank Corporation for Sprint Nextel Corp. filed by Sprint Nextel Corp.. (Kraftschik, Stephen)
February 25, 2014 71 ANSWER to 25 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand, by Sprint Nextel Corp..(Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 2/26/2014 (nms).
February 25, 2014 70 ANSWER to 25 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand, by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul) Modified on 2/25/2014 (nms).
February 4, 2014 69 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re (60 in 1:12-cv-01788-RGA, 60 in 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 68 in 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 72 in 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 65 in 1:12-cv-01703-RGA) MOTION to Set the Time to Answer the Complaints, filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, Google Inc., AT & T Mobility LLC, T-Moblie USA Inc., Cellco Partnership, Sprint Nextel Corp., Verizon Communications Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/4/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
February 3, 2014 68 MOTION to Set the Time to Answer the Complaints - filed by AT & T Mobility LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, Google Inc., T-Moblie USA Inc., Cellco Partnership, Verizon Communications Inc., Sprint Nextel Corp.. (Saindon, Paul)
January 30, 2014 67 Featured Case ORDER: On or before February 13, 2014, each party or each party group shall email to Magistrate Judge Thynge, with a copy to her Judicial Administrator, Cathleen Kennedy, the information required in the Order. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 1/30/14. (cak)
January 28, 2014 66 Featured Case ORDER Granting (D.I. 30 in 12-cv-01701-RGA) MOTION to Dismiss, and Granting in part and Denying in part (D.I. 32 in 12-cv-01701-RGA); Granting (D.I. 26 in 12-cv-01702-RGA) MOTION to Dismiss, and Granting in part and Denying in part (D.I. 28 in 12-cv-01702-RGA) MOTION to Dismiss; Granting (D.I. 27 in 12-cv-01703-RGA) MOTION to Dismiss, and Granting in part and Denying in part (D.I. 24 in 12-cv-01703-RGA) MOTION to Dismiss; Granting (D.I. 23 in 12-cv-01704-RGA) MOTION to Dismiss, and Granting in part and Denying in part (D.I. 25 in 12-cv-01704-RGA) MOTION to Dismiss; and Granting in part and Denying in part (D.I. 27 in 12-cv-01788-RGA) MOTION to Dismiss. Plaintiff is given leave to file a second amended complaint including indirect infringement claims within two weeks. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/28/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
January 27, 2014 65 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) Plaintiff's First Collective Interrogatories (1-7) to '933 Track Defendants, 2) Plaintiff's First Collective Interrogatories (1-7) to '970 Track Defendants; 3) Plaintiff's First Collective Requests for Production (1-26) to All '933 Track Defendants; and 4) Plaintiff's First Collective Requests for Production (1-26) to All '970 Track Defendants filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(Johnson, Edmond)
January 27, 2014 64 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's First Collective Interrogatories (1-7) to Call Processing Track Defendants AT&T Mobility, LLC, Google Inc., Sprint Nextel Corp., Verizon Comunications, Inc., Cellco Partnership, d.b.a. Verizon Wireless, and Broadsoft, Inc. and Plaintiff's First Collective Requests for Production (1-26) Related to All Call Processing Track Defendants AT&T Mobility, LLC, Google Inc., Sprint Nextel Corp., Verizon Comunications, Inc., Cellco Partnership, d.b.a. Verizon Wireless, and Broadsoft, Inc. filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(Johnson, Edmond)
January 27, 2014 63 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff CallWave Communications, LLC's Identification of Accused Products, Asserted Patents, and Asserted Claims to All Defendants filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(Johnson, Edmond)
January 27, 2014 62 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's First Interrogatories to Sprint Nextel Corp. Regarding the '933 Track (1) and Plaintiff's First Interrogatories to Sprint Nextel Corp. Relating to the '970 Track (1) filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(Johnson, Edmond)
January 27, 2014 61 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's First Request for Production of Documents to Google, Inc. Related to the Call Processing Track (1-11) filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(Johnson, Edmond)
January 27, 2014 60 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) Plaintiff's First Interrogatories to Google, Inc. Relating to the '970 Track (1); 2) Plaintiff's First Interrogatories to Google, Inc. Regarding the Call Processing Track (1); and 3) Plaintiff's First Interrogatories to Google, Inc. Regarding the '933 Track (1) filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(Johnson, Edmond)
January 13, 2014 59 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) Sprint's Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures Regarding the '970 Track; and 2) Sprint's Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures Regarding the '933 Patent and the Call Processing Patents filed by Sprint Nextel Corp..(Tennyson, Eleanor)
January 13, 2014 58 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures of Google Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) filed by Google Inc..(Blumenfeld, Jack)
January 13, 2014 57 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff CallWave Communications, LLC's Rule 26(A) Initial Disclosures filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
January 7, 2014 CASE REFERRED to Mediation. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(cak)
January 7, 2014 56 Featured Case ORDER Setting Teleconference: Counsel for Callwave to initiate the call. A Telephone Conference is set for 1/27/2014 at 2:30 PM EASTERN TIMNE before Judge Mary Pat Thynge to discuss ADR. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 1/7/14. (cak)
January 6, 2014 CASE REFERRED to Judge Thynge for Mediation. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA, 1:13-cv-00711-RGA(cak)
January 6, 2014 55 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Sprint's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Standing on U.S. Patent No. 6,771,970 by Sprint Nextel Corp. (see 52 Transcript, 28 MOTION to Dismiss) (Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 1/6/2014 (nms).
December 20, 2013 54 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER: Case referred to the Magistrate Judge for the purpose of exploring ADR. Joinder of Parties due by 6/17/2014. Amended Pleadings due by 6/17/2014. Fact Discovery due by 2/25/2015. A Trial Scheduling Conference is set for 8/28/2015, at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews Dispositive Motions due by 5/28/2015, and 8/7/2015. Joint Claim Construction Briefs due by 10/9/2014, and 12/10/2014. A Markman Hearings are set for 10/29/2014, and 1/7/2015, at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/20/2013. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA et al.(nms)
December 20, 2013 53 Proposed Scheduling Order, by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James) Modified on 12/20/2013 (nms).
December 20, 2013 CORRECTING ENTRY: DI 53 has been removed per request of the filer. (cla, )
December 17, 2013 52 Official Transcript of Scheduling Conference held on 12-12-13 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leonard A. DIbbs. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/7/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/17/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/17/2014. (lad)
December 12, 2013 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Andrews - Scheduling Conference held on 12/12/2013. (Court Reporter Leonard Dibbs.) Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA et al.(ksr, )
December 12, 2013 Featured Case ORAL ORDER: The Motion to Sever (D.I. 44 ) is DISMISSED AS PREMATURE, as discussed at the Rule 16 hearing on December 12, 2013. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/12/2013. (nms)
December 10, 2013 51 PROPOSED Scheduling Order, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Johnson, Edmond) Modified on 12/11/2013 (nms).
December 6, 2013 50 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding consideration of Defendants' motion to sever in connection with upcoming scheduling conference. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
December 5, 2013 49 REPLY BRIEF re 44 MOTION to Sever filed by Google Inc., Sprint Nextel Corp.. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
November 25, 2013 48 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 44 MOTION to Sever filed by CallWave Communications LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 12/5/2013. (McMillan, James)
November 18, 2013 47 Order Setting Rule 16(b) Conference: A Scheduling Conference is set for 12/12/2013, at 1:00 PM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/18/2013. (nms)
November 15, 2013 46 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding pending motions to sever and scheduling conference. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
November 12, 2013 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Kirk R. Ruthenberg for Sprint Nextel Corp. added for electronic noticing. (dmp, )
November 11, 2013 45 OPENING BRIEF in Support re 44 MOTION to Sever filed by Google Inc., Sprint Nextel Corp..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 11/29/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A-B, # 2 Exhibit A)(Saindon, Paul)
November 8, 2013 44 MOTION to Sever - filed by AT & T Mobility LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, Google Inc., T-Moblie USA Inc., Cellco Partnership, Verizon Communications Inc., Sprint Nextel Corp.. (Saindon, Paul)
November 7, 2013 43 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Edmond D. Johnson, Esq. regarding Request for a Scheduling Conference. (Johnson, Edmond)
November 6, 2013 42 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Imran A. Khaliq as co-counsel. Reason for request: no longer with firm. (Kraftschik, Stephen)
October 21, 2013 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 41 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kirk R. Ruthenberg of Dentons, LLP filed by Sprint Nextel Corp.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/21/2013. (nms)
October 18, 2013 41 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kirk R. Ruthenberg of Dentons, LLP - filed by Sprint Nextel Corp.. (Jacobs, Karen)
September 16, 2013 40 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by CallWave Communications LLC identifying Corporate Parent no corporate parent or other affiliate for CallWave Communications LLC.. (McMillan, James)
September 4, 2013 39 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding response to Plaintiff's September 3, 2013 letter - re (18 in 1:13-cv-00711-RGA, 38 in 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 44 in 1:12-cv-01748-RGA, 36 in 1:12-cv-01788-RGA, 36 in 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 38 in 1:13-cv-00074-RGA, 33 in 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 43 in 1:12-cv-01701-RGA) Letter. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
September 3, 2013 38 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Edmond D. Johnson, Esq. regarding request for scheduling conference. (Johnson, Edmond)
July 29, 2013 37 NOTICE of Subsequent Authority by CallWave Communications LLC re Motions to Dismiss. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(McMillan, James) Modified on 7/29/2013 (nms).
July 25, 2013 36 NOTICE of Subsequent Authority by AT&T Mobility LLC, T-Moblie USA Inc., Cellco Partnership, Google Inc., Verizon Communications Inc., Sprint Nextel Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Blumenfeld, Jack)
July 8, 2013 35 REPLY BRIEF re 28 MOTION to Dismiss, filed by Sprint Nextel Corp.. (Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 7/9/2013 (nms).
July 8, 2013 34 REPLY BRIEF re 26 MOTION to Dismiss, filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-D)(Saindon, Paul) Modified on 7/9/2013 (nms).
July 1, 2013 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re (30 in 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 37 in 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 27 in 1:12-cv-01704-RGA) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant Google Inc. to file its reply brief in support of its Motion to dismiss to July 8, 2013, filed by Google Inc., CallWave Communications LLC (Reset Briefing Schedule: re 27 in 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 23 in 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 26 in 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 30 in 1:12-cv-01701-RGA; MOTIONS to Dismiss. Reply Briefs due 7/8/2013)s. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/1/2013. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(nms)
July 1, 2013 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 32 Stipulation and Proposed Order to Extend Time, filed by CallWave Communications LLC, Sprint Nextel Corp. (Reset Briefing Schedule: re 28 MOTION to Dismiss. Reply Brief due 7/8/2013). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/1/2013. (nms)
July 1, 2013 33 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant Google Inc. to file its reply brief in support of its motion to dismiss to July 8, 2013 - filed by Google Inc., CallWave Communications LLC. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
July 1, 2013 32 STIPULATION and Order to extend time to file reply brief re 28 MOTION to Dismiss, by CallWave Communications LLC, Sprint Nextel Corp.. (Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 7/1/2013 (nms).
June 20, 2013 31 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 28 MOTION to Dismiss, and 26 MOTION to Dismiss, filed by CallWave Communications LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 7/1/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(McMillan, James) Modified on 6/25/2013 (nms).
June 3, 2013 30 DECLARATION of Imran A. Khaliq re 28 MOTION to Dismiss, by Sprint Nextel Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 6/4/2013 (nms).
June 3, 2013 29 OPENING BRIEF in Support re 28 MOTION to Dismiss, filed by Sprint Nextel Corp..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 6/20/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 6/4/2013 (nms).
June 3, 2013 28 MOTION to Dismiss - filed by Sprint Nextel Corp.. (Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 6/4/2013 (nms).
June 3, 2013 27 OPENING BRIEF in Support re 26 MOTION to Dismiss the Willful Infringement Claims in Callwave's Amended Complaints Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, filed by Google Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 6/20/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 6/4/2013 (nms).
June 3, 2013 26 MOTION to Dismiss the Willful Infringement Claims in Callwave's Amended Complaints Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure - filed by Google Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 6/4/2013 (nms).
May 3, 2013 25 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against Google Inc., Sprint Nextel Corp.- filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(nms)
May 3, 2013 24 Featured Case SO ORDERED re 23 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer Second Amended Complaint to June 3, 2013, filed by Google Inc., CallWave Communications LLC, Sprint Nextel Corp. (Reset Answer Deadlines: Google Inc. answer due 6/3/2013; Sprint Nextel Corp. answer due 6/3/2013). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/3/2013. (nms)
May 3, 2013 23 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer Second Amended Complaint to June 3, 2013 - filed by CallWave Communications LLC, Google Inc., Sprint Nextel Corp.. (Saindon, Paul)
April 29, 2013 22 REPLY to 12 MOTION to Dismiss, filed by Google Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 4/30/2013 (nms).
April 29, 2013 21 REPLY to 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, filed by Sprint Nextel Corp.. (Louden, Karen) Modified on 4/30/2013 (nms).
April 22, 2013 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Imran A. Khaliq,Mark L. Hogge,Shailendra K. Maheshwari for Sprint Nextel Corp. added for electronic noticing. (dmp, )
April 19, 2013 Remark: Set Answering Brief Deadline re 20 MOTION to Amend. Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 5/6/2013. (nms)
April 18, 2013 20 MOTION to Amend - filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to the Motion to Amend, # 2 Second Amended Complaint, # 3 Exhibit A to Second Amended Complaint, # 4 Exhibit B to Second Amended Complaint, # 5 Exhibit C to Second Amended Complaint, # 6 Exhibit D to Second Amended Complaint, # 7 Exhibit E to Second Amended Complaint, # 8 Exhibit F to Second Amended Complaint, # 9 Redlined Version of Second Amended Complaint)(McMillan, James) Modified on 4/19/2013 (nms).
April 18, 2013 19 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 12 MOTION to Dismiss, 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by CallWave Communications LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 4/29/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(McMillan, James)
April 9, 2013 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 18 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Mark L. Hogge, Shailendra K. Maheshwari, and Imran A. Khaliq filed by Sprint Nextel Corp.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/9/2013. (nms)
April 9, 2013 18 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Mark L. Hogge, Shailendra K. Maheshwari, and Imran A. Khaliq - filed by Sprint Nextel Corp.. (Kraftschik, Stephen)
April 3, 2013 17 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Sprint Nextel Corp.. (Kraftschik, Stephen)
April 1, 2013 16 OPENING BRIEF in Support re 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Sprint Nextel Corp..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 4/18/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-C)(Kraftschik, Stephen)
April 1, 2013 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by Sprint Nextel Corp.. (Kraftschik, Stephen)
April 1, 2013 14 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Google Inc. identifying Corporate Parent None for corporate parent or other public affiliates for Google Inc... (Blumenfeld, Jack)
April 1, 2013 13 OPENING BRIEF in Support re 12 MOTION to Dismiss, filed by Google Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 4/18/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 4/1/2013 (nms).
April 1, 2013 12 MOTION to Dismiss - filed by Google Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 4/1/2013 (nms).
March 22, 2013 Pro Hac Vice Attorney James F. Hurst,Scott R. Samay,Peter Lambrianakos,Krishnan Padmanabhan,Xi Chen for Google Inc. added for electronic noticing. (dmp, )
March 8, 2013 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney James F. Hurst, Scott R. Samay, Peter Lambrianakos, Krishnan Padmanabhan and Xi Chen filed by Google Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/8/2013. (nms)
March 7, 2013 11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney James F. Hurst, Scott R. Samay, Peter Lambrianakos, Krishnan Padmanabhan and Xi Chen - filed by Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul)
March 6, 2013 10 NOTICE of Appearance of Jack B. Blumenfeld and Paul Saindon on behalf of Google Inc. by Google Inc. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
February 11, 2013 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 9 Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Answer, filed by Sprint Nextel Corp. (Reset Answer Deadlines: Sprint Nextel Corp. answer due 4/1/2013). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/11/2013. (nms)
February 11, 2013 9 Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Answer - filed by Sprint Nextel Corp.. (Louden, Karen) Modified on 2/11/2013 (nms).
February 6, 2013 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Lauren Reznick for CallWave Communications LLC,Lauren Reznick for CallWave Communications LLC,Lauren Reznick for CallWave Communications LLC added for electronic noticing. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA(els)
February 5, 2013 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Lauren Reznick filed by CallWave Communications LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/5/2013. (nms)
February 4, 2013 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Lauren Reznick - filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Lauren Reznick)(McMillan, James)
January 31, 2013 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by CallWave Communications LLC: For Google Inc. waiver sent on 1/30/2013, answer due 4/1/2013. (Johnson, Edmond)
January 31, 2013 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Amended Complaint served on Sprint Nextel Corp. on 1/30/2013, filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James)
January 29, 2013 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Sprint Nextel Corp. on 1/29/2013. (maw)
January 29, 2013 5 First AMENDED COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against All Defendants - filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Johnson, Edmond)
December 26, 2012 Pro Hac Vice Attorney William D. Belanger for CallWave Communications LLC added for electronic noticing. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA(dmp, )
December 21, 2012 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Noah V. Malgeri for CallWave Communications LLC,Noah V. Malgeri for CallWave Communications LLC,Noah V. Malgeri for CallWave Communications LLC,Noah V. Malgeri for CallWave Communications LLC added for electronic noticing. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA(rbe)
December 21, 2012 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Benjamin Snitkoff for CallWave Communications LLC,Benjamin Snitkoff for CallWave Communications LLC,Benjamin Snitkoff for CallWave Communications LLC,Benjamin Snitkoff for CallWave Communications LLC added for electronic noticing. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA(rbe)
December 19, 2012 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney William D. Belanger, Noah V. Malgeri, Benjamin M. Snitkoff filed by CallWave Communications LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/19/2012. (nms)
December 19, 2012 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA (rjb)
December 17, 2012 4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney William D. Belanger, Noah V. Malgeri, Benjamin M. Snitkoff - filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of William D. Belanger, # 2 Certification of Noah V. Malgeri, # 3 Certification of Benjamin M. Snitkoff)(Johnson, Edmond)
December 12, 2012 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,771,970 B1; 7,907,933 B1; 8,325,901 B1;. (els)
December 12, 2012 No Summons Issued (els)
December 12, 2012 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction (els)
December 12, 2012 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Google Inc., Sprint Nextel Corp. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0311-1190005.) - filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(els)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CallWave Communication LLCv. Sprint Nextel Corp. et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CallWave Communications LLC
Represented By: William D. Belanger
Represented By: Edmond D. Johnson
Represented By: Noah V. Malgeri
Represented By: James Gordon McMillan, III
Represented By: Benjamin Snitkoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sprint Nextel Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?