CallWave Communication LLC v. T-Moblie USA Inc. et al. Featured Case
Plaintiff: CallWave Communications LLC
Defendant: Google Inc. and T-Moblie USA Inc.
Special Master: Yvonne Takvorian Saville, -SM-
Case Number: 1:2012cv01703
Filed: December 12, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2017 Filing 370 MANDATE of USCA as to 346 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit), filed by CallWave Communications LLC. USCA Decision: USDC Decision Affirmed. (Attachments: # 1 Judgment)(nms)
December 22, 2016 Filing 369 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Paul Saindon as co-counsel. Reason for request: No longer with firm. (Saindon, Paul)
September 30, 2016 Filing 368 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Noah V. Malgeri as co-counsel. Reason for request: he is no longer with the firm.. (McMillan, James)
September 30, 2016 Filing 368 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Noah V. Malgeri as co-counsel. Reason for request: he is no longer with the firm.. (McMillan, James)
September 27, 2016 Filing 367 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Leah R. McCoy as co-counsel. Reason for request: no longer with the firm. (McMillan, James)
September 27, 2016 Filing 367 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Leah R. McCoy as co-counsel. Reason for request: no longer with the firm. (McMillan, James)
August 16, 2016 Filing 366 NOTICE of Name Change and Email for Megan E. Lantto Pro Hac Vice by CallWave Communications LLC (McMillan, James)
August 16, 2016 Filing 366 NOTICE of Name Change and Email for Megan E. Lantto Pro Hac Vice by CallWave Communications LLC (McMillan, James)
July 21, 2016 Filing 365 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Bryana T. McGillycuddy as co-counsel. Reason for request: She is no longer with the firm.. (McMillan, James)
July 21, 2016 Filing 365 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Bryana T. McGillycuddy as co-counsel. Reason for request: She is no longer with the firm.. (McMillan, James)
July 12, 2016 Filing 364 NOTICE of Firm Telephone Number Change, by Paul Saindon (Saindon, Paul) Modified on 7/13/2016 (nms).
July 12, 2016 Filing 364 NOTICE of Firm Telephone Number Change, by Paul Saindon (Saindon, Paul) Modified on 7/13/2016 (nms).
July 11, 2016 Filing 363 NOTICE of Change of Address by Paul Saindon (Saindon, Paul)
July 11, 2016 Filing 363 NOTICE of Change of Address by Paul Saindon (Saindon, Paul)
July 6, 2016 Filing 362 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Google Inc.'s Third Supplemental Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
July 6, 2016 Filing 362 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Google Inc.'s Third Supplemental Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
June 27, 2016 Filing 361 Redaction version of (D.I. 509 in 12-cv-1702-RGA, D.I. 500 in 12-cv-1704-RGA, D.I. 523 in 12-cv-1701-RGA, D.I. 345 in 12-cv-01703-RGA) Sealed Transcript. (nms)
June 27, 2016 Filing 361 Redaction version of (D.I. 509 in 12-cv-1702-RGA, D.I. 500 in 12-cv-1704-RGA, D.I. 523 in 12-cv-1701-RGA, D.I. 345 in 12-cv-01703-RGA) Sealed Transcript. (nms)
June 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 360 ORDER Granting CallWave Communications, LLC's Unopposed MOTION to Seal Confidential Portions of the Transcript of the Hearing Before Special Master Saville on February, 24, 2016. Signed by Special Master Yvonne Saville on 6/27/2016. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(nms)
June 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 360 ORDER Granting CallWave Communications, LLC's Unopposed MOTION to Seal Confidential Portions of the Transcript of the Hearing Before Special Master Saville on February, 24, 2016. Signed by Special Master Yvonne Saville on 6/27/2016. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(nms)
June 27, 2016 CORRECTING ENTRY: The pdf for the Sealed Transcript of the February 24, 2016, conference before the Special Master has been replaced. The reference to Civil Action 13-711-RGA has been removed, and a reference to Civil Action 12-1703-RGA has been added. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(nms)
June 27, 2016 CORRECTING ENTRY: The pdf for the Sealed Transcript of the February 24, 2016, conference before the Special Master has been replaced. The reference to Civil Action 13-711-RGA has been removed, and a reference to Civil Action 12-1703-RGA has been added. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(nms)
June 23, 2016 CORRECTING ENTRY: The pdf for exhibits A-D attached to the redacted filing dated 3/21/2016, has been replaced with an amended version per counsel's request. Exhibit B has now been fully redacted. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA(nms)
June 23, 2016 CORRECTING ENTRY: The pdf for exhibits A-D attached to the redacted filing dated 3/21/2016, has been replaced with an amended version per counsel's request. Exhibit B has now been fully redacted. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA(nms)
June 13, 2016 Filing 359 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Christopher Boundy as co-counsel. Reason for request: no longer with firm. (McMillan, James)
June 13, 2016 Filing 359 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Christopher Boundy as co-counsel. Reason for request: no longer with firm. (McMillan, James)
April 4, 2016 Filing 358 REDACTED VERSION of #355 MOTION to Seal Confidential Portions of the Transcript of the Hearing Before Special Master Saville on February 24, 2016, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-D)(McMillan, James) Modified on 4/4/2016 (nms).
April 4, 2016 Filing 358 REDACTED VERSION of 355 MOTION to Seal Confidential Portions of the Transcript of the Hearing Before Special Master Saville on February 24, 2016, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-D)(McMillan, James) Modified on 4/4/2016 (nms).
April 1, 2016 Filing 357 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Callwave Communications, LLC's Third Supplemental Responses and Objections to Google's First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff Relating to the '970 Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
April 1, 2016 Filing 357 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Callwave Communications, LLC's Third Supplemental Responses and Objections to Google's First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff Relating to the '970 Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
March 30, 2016 Filing 356 7.1.1 Certification by CallWave Communications LLC re MOTION to Seal.(McMillan, James) Modified on 3/31/2016 (nms).
March 30, 2016 Filing 356 7.1.1 Certification by CallWave Communications LLC re MOTION to Seal.(McMillan, James) Modified on 3/31/2016 (nms).
March 28, 2016 Filing 355 [SEALED] MOTION to Seal Confidential Portions of the Transcript of the Hearing Before Special Master Saville on February 24, 2016 - filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(McMillan, James) Modified on 4/4/2016 (nms).
March 28, 2016 Filing 355 [SEALED] MOTION to Seal Confidential Portions of the Transcript of the Hearing Before Special Master Saville on February 24, 2016 - filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D)(McMillan, James) Modified on 4/4/2016 (nms).
March 24, 2016 Filing 354 Amended TRANSCRIPT REQUEST, by CallWave Communications LLC - Transcript is Already on File. (McMillan, James) Modified on 3/29/2016 (nms).
March 24, 2016 Filing 354 Amended TRANSCRIPT REQUEST, by CallWave Communications LLC - Transcript is Already on File. (McMillan, James) Modified on 3/29/2016 (nms).
March 21, 2016 Filing 353 REDACTED VERSION of #351 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Transcript, by Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-D, #2 Proposed Order)(Saindon, Paul) Modified on 3/21/2016 (nms). (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/23/2016) (nms).
March 21, 2016 Filing 353 REDACTED VERSION of 351 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Transcript, by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-D, # 2 Proposed Order)(Saindon, Paul) Modified on 3/21/2016 (nms).
March 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 352 ORDER Granting [SEALED] Unopposed MOTION to Seal the Transcript of hearing held on 2/24/2016. Signed by Yvonne Saville, Special Master on 3/16/2016. Associated Cases: 12-cv-1701-RGA, 12-cv-01702-RGA, 12-cv-1703-RGA, 12-cv-1704-RGA(ksr, ) Modified on 6/20/2016 (nms).
March 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 352 ORDER granting (530) [SEALED] Unopposed MOTION to Seal Transcript in case 1:12-cv-01701-RGA; granting (515) Motion to Seal Document in case 1:12-cv-01702-RGA; granting (351) Motion to Seal Document in case 1:12-cv-01703-RGA; granting (507) Motion to Seal Document in case 1:12-cv-01704-RGA. Signed by Yvonne Saville, Special Master on 3/16/2016. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(ksr, )
March 15, 2016 CORRECTING ENTRY: A proposed order has been added to the Unopposed Motion to Seal Confidential Portions of the Transcript of the Hearing Before Special Master Saville on February 24, 2016, filed on March 14, 2016. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(nms)
March 15, 2016 CORRECTING ENTRY: A proposed order has been added to the Unopposed Motion to Seal Confidential Portions of the Transcript of the Hearing Before Special Master Saville on February 24, 2016, filed on March 14, 2016. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(nms)
March 14, 2016 Filing 351 [SEALED] Unopposed MOTION to Seal Transcript - filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-D)(Saindon, Paul) Modified on 3/15/2016 (nms). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/15/2016: #4 Proposed Order) (nms).
March 14, 2016 Filing 351 [SEALED] Unopposed MOTION to Seal Transcript - filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-D)(Saindon, Paul) Modified on 3/15/2016 (nms). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/15/2016: # 4 Proposed Order) (nms).
March 14, 2016 Filing 350 CORRECTED NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA for the Federal Circuit re #346 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit), filed by CallWave Communications LLC. USCA Case Number 16-1686. (nms)
March 14, 2016 Filing 350 CORRECTED NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA for the Federal Circuit re 346 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit), filed by CallWave Communications LLC. USCA Case Number 16-1686. (nms)
March 14, 2016 Filing 349 NOTICE of Subsequent Authority (Peschke Map Technologies LLC v. Rouse Properties Inc.) by Google Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Saindon, Paul)
March 14, 2016 Filing 349 NOTICE of Subsequent Authority (Peschke Map Technologies LLC v. Rouse Properties Inc.) by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Saindon, Paul)
March 11, 2016 Filing 348 NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA for the Federal Circuit re #346 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit), filed by CallWave Communications LLC. USCA Case Number 16-1686. (nms)
March 11, 2016 Filing 348 NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA for the Federal Circuit re 346 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit), filed by CallWave Communications LLC. USCA Case Number 16-1686. (nms)
March 10, 2016 Filing 347 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by CallWave Communications LLC for proceedings held on February 9, 2016 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Transcript Not Needed. (McMillan, James) Modified on 3/10/2016 (nms).
March 10, 2016 Filing 347 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by CallWave Communications LLC for proceedings held on February 9, 2016 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Transcript Not Needed. (McMillan, James) Modified on 3/10/2016 (nms).
March 10, 2016 Filing 346 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Federal Circuit of 338 Judgment, 336 Order, . Appeal filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James)
March 10, 2016 Filing 346 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Federal Circuit of #338 Judgment, #336 Order, . Appeal filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James)
March 10, 2016 APPEAL - Credit Card Payment of $505.00 received re 346 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit) filed by CallWave Communications LLC. ( Filing fee $505, receipt number 0311-1892657.) (McMillan, James)
March 10, 2016 APPEAL - Credit Card Payment of $505.00 received re #346 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit) filed by CallWave Communications LLC. ( Filing fee $505, receipt number 0311-1892657.) (McMillan, James)
March 10, 2016 Notification regarding #346 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit) sent to Reporter Dibbs. (cna)
March 10, 2016 Notification regarding 346 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit) sent to Reporter Dibbs. (cna)
March 7, 2016 Filing 345 SEALED Official Transcript of Discovery Conference held on 2/24/2016 before Judge Special Master Yvonne Takvorian Saville. Court Reporter/Transcriber Basye Santiago Reporting,Telephone number (302) 573-2300. (ksr, ) Modified on 6/21/2016 (nms). (Main Document 345 replaced on 6/27/2016) (nms).
March 7, 2016 Filing 345 Official Transcript of Discovery Conference held on 2/24/2016 before Judge Special Master Yvonne Takvorian Saville. Court Reporter/Transcriber Basye Santiago Reporting,Telephone number (302) 573-2300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 3/28/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/7/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/6/2016. (ksr, )
March 7, 2016 Filing 344 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Fifth Supplemental Responses to Defendant' First Common Set of Interrogatories Relating to the '970 Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
March 7, 2016 Filing 344 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Fifth Supplemental Responses to Defendant' First Common Set of Interrogatories Relating to the '970 Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
March 3, 2016 Filing 343 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Second Supplemental Responses and Objections to Google's First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff Callwave Communications, LLC Relating to the '970 Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
March 3, 2016 Filing 343 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Second Supplemental Responses and Objections to Google's First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff Callwave Communications, LLC Relating to the '970 Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
March 2, 2016 Filing 342 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Response and Objections to Defendants' Notice of Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition to Plaintiff Callwave Communications, LLC Related to the '970 Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
March 2, 2016 Filing 342 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Response and Objections to Defendants' Notice of Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition to Plaintiff Callwave Communications, LLC Related to the '970 Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
March 1, 2016 Filing 341 REDACTED VERSION of 340 Letter, by Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul) Modified on 3/1/2016 (nms).
March 1, 2016 Filing 341 REDACTED VERSION of #340 Letter, by Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul) Modified on 3/1/2016 (nms).
March 1, 2016 REDACTION NOTICE: In accordance with section G of the Administrative Procedures Governing Filing and Service by Electronic Means, redacted versions of sealed documents shall be filed electronically within 7 days of the filing of the sealed document. #340 . (nms)
March 1, 2016 REDACTION NOTICE: In accordance with section G of the Administrative Procedures Governing Filing and Service by Electronic Means, redacted versions of sealed documents shall be filed electronically within 7 days of the filing of the sealed document. 340 . (nms)
February 18, 2016 Filing 340 [SEALED] Letter to Special Master Saville from Paul Saindon regarding Discovery. (Saindon, Paul)
February 18, 2016 Filing 340 [SEALED] Letter to Special Master Saville from Paul Saindon regarding Discovery. (Saindon, Paul)
February 17, 2016 Filing 339 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Google Inc.'s Supplemental Responses and Objections to Callwave Communications, LLC's First Interrogatories to Google Regarding the '970 Track filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
February 17, 2016 Filing 339 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Google Inc.'s Supplemental Responses and Objections to Callwave Communications, LLC's First Interrogatories to Google Regarding the '970 Track filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
February 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 338 FINAL JUDGMENT in favor of Defendants and against Callwave on the claims for infringement of claims 13-17 of the '933 Patent (see Judgment for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/9/2016. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms) Modified on 2/9/2016 (nms).
February 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 338 FINAL JUDGMENT in favor of Defendants and against Callwave on the claims for infringement of claims 13-17 of the '933 Patent (see Judgment for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/9/2016. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms) Modified on 2/9/2016 (nms).
February 8, 2016 Filing 337 PROPOSED Final Judgment, by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James) Modified on 2/9/2016 (nms).
February 8, 2016 Filing 337 PROPOSED Final Judgment, by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James) Modified on 2/9/2016 (nms).
February 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 336 ORDER Granting (417 in 12-cv-1702-RGA, 373 in 12-cv-1704-RGA, 237 in 12-cv-1788-RGA, 308 in 12-cv-1703-RGA, 394 in 12-cv-1701-RGA) MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b). Plaintiff is DIRECTED to submit within five days a jointly agreed order to accomplish the above (see Order for details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/3/2016. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
February 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 336 ORDER Granting (417 in 12-cv-1702-RGA, 373 in 12-cv-1704-RGA, 237 in 12-cv-1788-RGA, 308 in 12-cv-1703-RGA, 394 in 12-cv-1701-RGA) MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b). Plaintiff is DIRECTED to submit within five days a jointly agreed order to accomplish the above (see Order for details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/3/2016. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
January 18, 2016 Filing 335 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Final Invalidity Contentions on the '970 Patent filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
January 18, 2016 Filing 335 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Final Invalidity Contentions on the '970 Patent filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
January 12, 2016 Filing 334 REDACTED VERSION of 326 Letter, by Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul) Modified on 1/12/2016 (nms).
January 12, 2016 Filing 334 REDACTED VERSION of #326 Letter, by Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul) Modified on 1/12/2016 (nms).
January 12, 2016 Filing 333 REDACTED VERSION of 327 Letter, by Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul) Modified on 1/12/2016 (nms).
January 12, 2016 Filing 333 REDACTED VERSION of #327 Letter, by Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul) Modified on 1/12/2016 (nms).
January 12, 2016 CORRECTING ENTRY: D.I. 332 has been removed from the docket as it was incorrectly linked to the document it is redacting. Counsel will refile accordingly. (nms)
January 12, 2016 CORRECTING ENTRY: D.I. 332 has been removed from the docket as it was incorrectly linked to the document it is redacting. Counsel will refile accordingly. (nms)
January 11, 2016 Filing 331 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Collective Reduced Set of Prior Art in the '970 Track filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
January 11, 2016 Filing 331 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Collective Reduced Set of Prior Art in the '970 Track filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
January 11, 2016 Filing 330 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Second Supplemental Invalidity Contentions on the '970 Patent filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
January 11, 2016 Filing 330 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Second Supplemental Invalidity Contentions on the '970 Patent filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
January 8, 2016 Filing 329 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Google's Second Supplemental Invalidity Contentions on the '970 Patent filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
January 8, 2016 Filing 329 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Google's Second Supplemental Invalidity Contentions on the '970 Patent filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
January 8, 2016 Filing 328 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Collective and Google Inc.'s, Blackberry's and Verizon's Individual Requests for Admission to Plaintiff Callwave Communications, LLC Relating to the '970 Track filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
January 8, 2016 Filing 328 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Collective and Google Inc.'s, Blackberry's and Verizon's Individual Requests for Admission to Plaintiff Callwave Communications, LLC Relating to the '970 Track filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
January 7, 2016 Filing 327 [SEALED] Letter to Special Master Saville from Paul Saindon regarding Response to Callwave's 1/6/16 Letter. (Saindon, Paul)
January 7, 2016 Filing 327 [SEALED] Letter to Special Master Saville from Paul Saindon regarding Response to Callwave's 1/6/16 Letter. (Saindon, Paul)
January 6, 2016 Filing 326 [SEALED] Letter to Special Master Saville from Paul Saindon regarding Discovery. (Saindon, Paul)
January 6, 2016 Filing 326 [SEALED] Letter to Special Master Saville from Paul Saindon regarding Discovery. (Saindon, Paul)
December 29, 2015 Filing 325 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Second Supplemental Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
December 29, 2015 Filing 325 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Second Supplemental Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
December 23, 2015 Filing 324 NOTICE of Withdrawal requesting Clerk to remove Edmond D. Johnson, formerly of Pepper Hamilton LLP as lead counsel. Reason for request: no longer with firm. by CallWave Communications LLC (McMillan, James)
December 23, 2015 Filing 324 NOTICE of Withdrawal requesting Clerk to remove Edmond D. Johnson, formerly of Pepper Hamilton LLP as lead counsel. Reason for request: no longer with firm. by CallWave Communications LLC (McMillan, James)
December 11, 2015 Filing 323 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Fourth Supplemental Responses to Defendants' First Common Set of Interrogatories Relating to the '970 Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
December 11, 2015 Filing 323 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Fourth Supplemental Responses to Defendants' First Common Set of Interrogatories Relating to the '970 Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
October 30, 2015 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Philip T. Chen for Google Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(dmp, )
October 30, 2015 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Nathaniel T. Browand for Google Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(dmp, )
October 30, 2015 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Nathaniel T. Browand for Google Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(dmp, )
October 30, 2015 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Mark C. Scarsi for Google Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(dmp, )
October 30, 2015 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Dat Nguyen for Google Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(dmp, )
October 30, 2015 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Mark C. Scarsi for Google Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(dmp, )
October 30, 2015 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Dat Nguyen for Google Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(dmp, )
October 30, 2015 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Philip T. Chen for Google Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(dmp, )
October 30, 2015 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Ashlee Lin for Google Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(dmp, )
October 30, 2015 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Christopher J. Gaspar for Google Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(dmp, )
October 30, 2015 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Ashlee Lin for Google Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(dmp, )
October 30, 2015 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Christopher J. Gaspar for Google Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(dmp, )
October 27, 2015 Filing 322 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Kaustuv M. Das as co-counsel. Reason for request: No longer with firm. (Newell, Ryan)
October 27, 2015 Filing 322 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Kaustuv M. Das as co-counsel. Reason for request: No longer with firm. (Newell, Ryan)
October 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 321 ORAL ORDER: Defendant T-Mobile USA Inc., is excused from the conference scheduled for 10/29/2015. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/27/2015. (nms)
October 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 321 ORAL ORDER: Defendant T-Mobile USA Inc., is excused from the conference scheduled for 10/29/2015. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/27/2015. (nms)
October 26, 2015 Filing 320 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Ryan P. Newell regarding Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. (Newell, Ryan) Modified on 10/26/2015 (nms).
October 26, 2015 Filing 320 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Ryan P. Newell regarding Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. (Newell, Ryan) Modified on 10/26/2015 (nms).
October 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 319 ORDER: Referring the motion to strike and motion to expedite to the Special Master. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/23/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:13-cv-00711-RGA(nms)
October 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 319 ORDER: Referring the motion to strike and motion to expedite to the Special Master. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/23/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:13-cv-00711-RGA(nms)
October 22, 2015 Filing 318 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding opposition to Callwave's Motion to Shorten the Briefing Schedule. (Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 10/23/2015 (nms).
October 22, 2015 Filing 318 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding opposition to Callwave's Motion to Shorten the Briefing Schedule. (Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 10/23/2015 (nms).
October 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 317 Order Setting Rule 16(b) Conference: A Scheduling Conference is set for 10/29/2015, at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/15/2015. (nms)
October 15, 2015 Filing 317 Order Setting Rule 16(b) Conference: A Scheduling Conference is set for 10/29/2015, at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/15/2015. (nms)
October 6, 2015 Filing 316 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding oral argument on CallWave's Motion to Lift the Stay of Proceedings on the '970 Patent scheduled for Friday, October 9, 2015. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
October 6, 2015 Filing 316 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding oral argument on CallWave's Motion to Lift the Stay of Proceedings on the '970 Patent scheduled for Friday, October 9, 2015. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
October 5, 2015 Filing 315 Supplemental Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Alphabet Inc. for Google Inc. filed by Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul)
October 5, 2015 Filing 315 Supplemental Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Alphabet Inc. for Google Inc. filed by Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul)
September 25, 2015 Filing 314 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Reply Expert Report of Dr. Eric Burger Regarding Invalidity of U.S. Patent Nos. 7,397,910, 7,555,110, 8,325,901 and 7,822,188 filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
September 25, 2015 Filing 314 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Reply Expert Report of Dr. Eric Burger Regarding Invalidity of U.S. Patent Nos. 7,397,910, 7,555,110, 8,325,901 and 7,822,188 filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
September 15, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 313 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Mark C. Scarsi, Philip T. Chen, Ashlee Lin, Dat Nguyen, Christopher Gaspar and Nathaniel Browand of MILBANK, TWEED, HADLEY & MCCLOY LLP filed by Google Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/15/2015. (nms)
September 15, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #313 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Mark C. Scarsi, Philip T. Chen, Ashlee Lin, Dat Nguyen, Christopher Gaspar and Nathaniel Browand of MILBANK, TWEED, HADLEY & MCCLOY LLP filed by Google Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/15/2015. (nms)
September 14, 2015 Filing 313 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Mark C. Scarsi, Philip T. Chen, Ashlee Lin, Dat Nguyen, Christopher Gaspar and Nathaniel Browand of Milbank, Tweed, Hadley & Mccloy LLP- filed by Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul) Modified on 9/15/2015 (nms).
September 14, 2015 Filing 313 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Mark C. Scarsi, Philip T. Chen, Ashlee Lin, Dat Nguyen, Christopher Gaspar and Nathaniel Browand of Milbank, Tweed, Hadley & Mccloy LLP- filed by Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul) Modified on 9/15/2015 (nms).
June 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 312 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master for (391 in 12-cv-1701-RGA, 307 in 12-cv-1703-RGA, 370 in 12-cv-1704-RGA, 414 in 12-cv-1702-RGA). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/29/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(nms)
June 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 312 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master for (391 in 12-cv-1701-RGA, 307 in 12-cv-1703-RGA, 370 in 12-cv-1704-RGA, 414 in 12-cv-1702-RGA). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/29/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(nms)
June 22, 2015 Filing 311 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding entry of Rule 54(b) judgment. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
June 22, 2015 Filing 311 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding entry of Rule 54(b) judgment. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
June 17, 2015 Filing 310 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Google Inc.'s Factual Disclosure filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
June 17, 2015 Filing 310 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Google Inc.'s Factual Disclosure filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
June 15, 2015 Filing 309 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Second Supplemental Responses to Google Inc.'s First Individual Interrogatories Relating to the Call Processing Track (5-7) filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
June 15, 2015 Filing 309 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Second Supplemental Responses to Google Inc.'s First Individual Interrogatories Relating to the Call Processing Track (5-7) filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
June 4, 2015 Set Answering Brief Deadline re #308 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) . Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 6/22/2015. (nms)
June 4, 2015 Set Answering Brief Deadline re 308 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) . Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 6/22/2015. (nms)
June 4, 2015 Filing 308 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) - filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (Johnson, Edmond)
June 4, 2015 Filing 308 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) - filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (Johnson, Edmond)
June 1, 2015 Filing 307 RULINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master Yvonne Takvorian Saville - Objections to R&R due by 6/25/2015. Signed by Yvonne Takvorian Saville, Special Master on 6/1/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(ksr, )
June 1, 2015 Filing 307 RULINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master Yvonne Takvorian Saville - Objections to R&R due by 6/25/2015. Signed by Yvonne Takvorian Saville, Special Master on 6/1/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(ksr, )
May 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 306 ORDER Granting 304 Stipulation of Dismissal regarding U.S. Patent No. 6,771,970, filed by CallWave Communications LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/27/2015. (nms)
May 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 306 ORDER Granting #304 Stipulation of Dismissal regarding U.S. Patent No. 6,771,970, filed by CallWave Communications LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/27/2015. (nms)
May 26, 2015 Filing 305 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Supplemental Responses to Google Inc.'s First Individual Interrogatories Relating to the Call Processing Track (5) filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
May 26, 2015 Filing 305 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Supplemental Responses to Google Inc.'s First Individual Interrogatories Relating to the Call Processing Track (5) filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
May 26, 2015 Filing 304 STIPULATION of Dismissal, by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James) Modified on 5/27/2015 (nms).
May 26, 2015 Filing 304 STIPULATION of Dismissal, by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James) Modified on 5/27/2015 (nms).
May 20, 2015 Filing 303 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Google Inc.'s Supplemental Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
May 20, 2015 Filing 303 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Google Inc.'s Supplemental Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
May 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 302 SO ORDERED re (378 in 12-cv-1701-RGA, 353 in 12-cv-1704-RGA, 301 in 12-cv-1703-RGA, 399 in 12-cv-1702-RGA, 235 in 12-cv-1788-RGA) Stipulation and Proposed Order of Non-Infringement, filed by CallWave Communications LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/4/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
May 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 302 SO ORDERED re (378 in 12-cv-1701-RGA, 353 in 12-cv-1704-RGA, 301 in 12-cv-1703-RGA, 399 in 12-cv-1702-RGA, 235 in 12-cv-1788-RGA) Stipulation and Proposed Order of Non-Infringement, filed by CallWave Communications LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/4/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
May 4, 2015 Filing 301 STIPULATION and Proposed Order of Non-Infringement, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Johnson, Edmond) Modified on 5/5/2015 (nms).
May 4, 2015 Filing 301 STIPULATION and Proposed Order of Non-Infringement, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Johnson, Edmond) Modified on 5/5/2015 (nms).
April 15, 2015 Filing 300 Redaction Version of #250 Transcript. (nms)
April 15, 2015 Filing 300 Redaction Version of 250 Transcript. (nms)
April 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 299 ORDER Appointing Special Master: Yvonne Takvorian Saville appointed (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/14/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA et al.(nms)
April 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 299 ORDER Appointing Special Master: Yvonne Takvorian Saville appointed (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/14/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA et al.(nms)
April 14, 2015 Filing 298 REDACTED VERSION of 293 Reply to Motion, by AT&T Mobility LLC, T-Moblie USA Inc., Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 4/14/2015 (nms).
April 14, 2015 Filing 298 REDACTED VERSION of #293 Reply to Motion, by AT&T Mobility LLC, T-Moblie USA Inc., Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 4/14/2015 (nms).
April 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 297 ORDER Granting in part MOTION to Seal Confidential Portions of Transcript of Motion to Stay (see D.I. 334 in 12-cv-1701-RGA, D.I. 279 in 12-cv-1703-RGA, D.I. 330 in 12-cv-1702-RGA) (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/14/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA(nms)
April 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 297 ORDER Granting in part MOTION to Seal Confidential Portions of Transcript of Motion to Stay (see D.I. 334 in 12-cv-1701-RGA, D.I. 279 in 12-cv-1703-RGA, D.I. 330 in 12-cv-1702-RGA) (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/14/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA(nms)
April 14, 2015 REDACTION NOTICE: In accordance with section G of the Administrative Procedures Governing Filing and Service by Electronic Means, redacted versions of sealed documents shall be filed electronically within 7 days of the filing of the sealed document. The records of this case do not reflect the filing of a redacted version of DI #293 . (nms)
April 14, 2015 REDACTION NOTICE: In accordance with section G of the Administrative Procedures Governing Filing and Service by Electronic Means, redacted versions of sealed documents shall be filed electronically within 7 days of the filing of the sealed document. The records of this case do not reflect the filing of a redacted version of DI # 293 . (nms)
April 13, 2015 Filing 296 Proposed Order for Motion to Seal Confidential Portions of Transcript, by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 4/14/2015 (nms).
April 13, 2015 Filing 296 Proposed Order for Motion to Seal Confidential Portions of Transcript, by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 4/14/2015 (nms).
April 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 295 ORDER REFERRING CASES to Clerk for assignment of a Special Master. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/13/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA et al.(nms)
April 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 295 ORDER REFERRING CASES to Clerk for assignment of a Special Master. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/13/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA et al.(nms)
April 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 294 ORAL ORDER: The moving party to the application to Seal Confidential Portions of Transcript of Motion to Stay Heard on February 10, 2015 (see 334 in 12-cv-1701-RGA, 279 in 12-cv-1703-RGA, 330 in 12-cv-1702-RGA) shall within 3 days of the date of this Order submit a revised proposed order that specifies the pages and lines of the requested redactions so that the Order will speak for itself as to what is redacted. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/8/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA(nms)
April 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 294 ORAL ORDER: The moving party to the application to Seal Confidential Portions of Transcript of Motion to Stay Heard on February 10, 2015 (see 334 in 12-cv-1701-RGA, 279 in 12-cv-1703-RGA, 330 in 12-cv-1702-RGA) shall within 3 days of the date of this Order submit a revised proposed order that specifies the pages and lines of the requested redactions so that the Order will speak for itself as to what is redacted. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/8/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA(nms)
April 2, 2015 Filing 293 [SEALED] REPLY to 279 MOTION to Seal Confidential Portions of Transcript of Motion to Stay Heard on February 10, 2015, filed by T-Moblie USA Inc.. (Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 4/6/2015 (nms).
April 2, 2015 Filing 293 [SEALED] REPLY to #279 MOTION to Seal Confidential Portions of Transcript of Motion to Stay Heard on February 10, 2015, filed by T-Moblie USA Inc.. (Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 4/6/2015 (nms).
April 2, 2015 Filing 292 REDACTED VERSION of #290 Response to Motion, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Johnson, Edmond) Modified on 4/2/2015 (nms).
April 2, 2015 Filing 292 REDACTED VERSION of 290 Response to Motion, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Johnson, Edmond) Modified on 4/2/2015 (nms).
April 2, 2015 CORRECTING ENTRY: The redaction filed at D.I. 292 has been removed from the docket. Counsel shall refile this document and link it to the sealed filing it relates to. (nms)
April 2, 2015 REDACTION NOTICE: In accordance with section G of the Administrative Procedures Governing Filing and Service by Electronic Means, redacted versions of sealed documents shall be filed electronically within 7 days of the filing of the sealed document. The records of this case do not reflect the filing of a redacted version of DI # 290 . (nms)
April 2, 2015 REDACTION NOTICE: In accordance with section G of the Administrative Procedures Governing Filing and Service by Electronic Means, redacted versions of sealed documents shall be filed electronically within 7 days of the filing of the sealed document. The records of this case do not reflect the filing of a redacted version of DI #290 . (nms)
April 2, 2015 CORRECTING ENTRY: The redaction filed at D.I. 292 has been removed from the docket. Counsel shall refile this document and link it to the sealed filing it relates to. (nms)
March 24, 2015 Filing 291 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Callwave Communications, LLC's Sealed Response To Defendants AT&T Mobility LLC, T-Mobile USA, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P., And Sprint Communications Company L.P.'s Motion To Seal Confidential Portions Of Transcript Of Motion To Stay Heard On February 10, 2015, and Exhibits A and B, by CallWave Communications LLC (Johnson, Edmond) Modified on 3/24/2015 (nms).
March 24, 2015 Filing 291 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Callwave Communications, LLC's Sealed Response To Defendants AT&T Mobility LLC, T-Mobile USA, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P., And Sprint Communications Company L.P.'s Motion To Seal Confidential Portions Of Transcript Of Motion To Stay Heard On February 10, 2015, and Exhibits A and B, by CallWave Communications LLC (Johnson, Edmond) Modified on 3/24/2015 (nms).
March 24, 2015 CORRECTING ENTRY: The Certificate of Service filed at D.I. 291 has been removed from the docket. Counsel shall re-file this document which shall include the appropriate caption with the party names and case number. (nms)
March 24, 2015 CORRECTING ENTRY: The Certificate of Service filed at D.I. 291 has been removed from the docket. Counsel shall re-file this document which shall include the appropriate caption with the party names and case number. (nms)
March 23, 2015 Filing 290 [SEALED] RESPONSE to #279 MOTION to Seal Portions of Transcript of Motion to Stay Heard on February 10, 2015, filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Johnson, Edmond) Modified on 3/23/2015 (nms).
March 23, 2015 Filing 290 [SEALED] RESPONSE to 279 MOTION to Seal Portions of Transcript of Motion to Stay Heard on February 10, 2015, filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Johnson, Edmond) Modified on 3/23/2015 (nms).
March 20, 2015 Filing 289 REDACTED VERSION of 282 Letter, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit F, # 5 Certificate of Service)(Johnson, Edmond) Modified on 3/23/2015 (nms).
March 20, 2015 Filing 289 REDACTED VERSION of #282 Letter, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit F, #5 Certificate of Service)(Johnson, Edmond) Modified on 3/23/2015 (nms).
March 19, 2015 Filing 288 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Megan E. Lantto - filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James)
March 19, 2015 Filing 288 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Megan E. Lantto - filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James)
March 19, 2015 Filing 287 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Bryana T. McGillycuddy - filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James)
March 19, 2015 Filing 287 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Bryana T. McGillycuddy - filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James)
March 19, 2015 Filing 286 REDACTED VERSION of #280 Letter, by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 3/19/2015 (nms).
March 19, 2015 Filing 286 REDACTED VERSION of 280 Letter, by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 3/19/2015 (nms).
March 19, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (226 in 12-cv-1788-RGA, 287 in 12-cv-1703-RGA, 322 in 12-cv-1704-RGA, 341 in 12-cv-1702-RGA, 345 in 12-cv-1701-RGA, 165 in 13-cv-711-RGA) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Bryana T. McGillycuddy, filed by CallWave Communications LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/19/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA et al.(nms)
March 19, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (288 in 12-cv-1703-RGA, 323 in 12-cv-1704-RGA, 346 in 12-cv-1701-RGA, 166 in 13-cv-711-RGA, 227 in 12-cv-1788-RGA, 342 in 12-cv-1702-RGA) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Megan E. Lantto filed by CallWave Communications LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/19/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA et al.(nms)
March 19, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (226 in 12-cv-1788-RGA, 287 in 12-cv-1703-RGA, 322 in 12-cv-1704-RGA, 341 in 12-cv-1702-RGA, 345 in 12-cv-1701-RGA, 165 in 13-cv-711-RGA) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Bryana T. McGillycuddy, filed by CallWave Communications LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/19/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA et al.(nms)
March 19, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (288 in 12-cv-1703-RGA, 323 in 12-cv-1704-RGA, 346 in 12-cv-1701-RGA, 166 in 13-cv-711-RGA, 227 in 12-cv-1788-RGA, 342 in 12-cv-1702-RGA) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Megan E. Lantto filed by CallWave Communications LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/19/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA et al.(nms)
March 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 285 ORAL ORDER: The Motions for Judgment on the Pleadings of the '970 Patent (D.I. 257 and 281 in 12cv1701-RGA, 251 and 277 in 12cv1702-RGA, 213 and 237 in 12cv1703-RGA, and 234 and 262 in 12cv1704-RGA) are Dismissed with Leave To Renew upon the expiration of the Stay regarding the '970 Patent. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/18/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(nms)
March 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 285 ORAL ORDER: The Motions for Judgment on the Pleadings of the '970 Patent (D.I. 257 and 281 in 12cv1701-RGA, 251 and 277 in 12cv1702-RGA, 213 and 237 in 12cv1703-RGA, and 234 and 262 in 12cv1704-RGA) are Dismissed with Leave To Renew upon the expiration of the Stay regarding the '970 Patent. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/18/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(nms)
March 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 284 MEMORANDUM ORDER Granting (228 in 12-cv-1701-RGA, 166 in 12-cv-1788-RGA, 207 in 12-cv-1704-RGA, 193 in 12-cv-1703-RGA, 223 in 12-cv-1702-RGA) Renewed Motion to Stay Proceedings on the '970 Patent Pending Inter Partes Review. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/18/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
March 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 284 MEMORANDUM ORDER Granting (228 in 12-cv-1701-RGA, 166 in 12-cv-1788-RGA, 207 in 12-cv-1704-RGA, 193 in 12-cv-1703-RGA, 223 in 12-cv-1702-RGA) Renewed Motion to Stay Proceedings on the '970 Patent Pending Inter Partes Review. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/18/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
March 13, 2015 Filing 283 EXHIBITS D and E to Letter dated 3/13/2014, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Johnson, Edmond) Modified on 3/13/2015 (nms).
March 13, 2015 Filing 283 EXHIBITS D and E to Letter dated 3/13/2014, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Johnson, Edmond) Modified on 3/13/2015 (nms).
March 13, 2015 Filing 282 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Edmond D. Johnson regarding Response to Karen Jacobs' Letter of March 11, 2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit F, # 5 Certificate of Service)(Johnson, Edmond)
March 13, 2015 Filing 282 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Edmond D. Johnson regarding Response to Karen Jacobs' Letter of March 11, 2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit F, #5 Certificate of Service)(Johnson, Edmond)
March 12, 2015 Filing 281 REDACTED VERSION of #279 MOTION to Seal Confidential Portions of Transcript of Motion to Stay Heard on February 10, 2015, by AT&T Mobility LLC, T-Moblie USA Inc., Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-E)(Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 3/13/2015 (nms).
March 12, 2015 Filing 281 REDACTED VERSION of 279 MOTION to Seal Confidential Portions of Transcript of Motion to Stay Heard on February 10, 2015, by AT&T Mobility LLC, T-Moblie USA Inc., Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-E)(Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 3/13/2015 (nms).
March 11, 2015 Filing 280 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Karen Jacobs regarding status report. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Jacobs, Karen) Modified on 3/11/2015 (nms).
March 11, 2015 Filing 280 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Karen Jacobs regarding status report. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Jacobs, Karen) Modified on 3/11/2015 (nms).
March 4, 2015 Set Answering Brief Deadline re (334 in 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 279 in 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 330 in 1:12-cv-01702-RGA) MOTION to Seal Confidential Portions of Transcript of Motion to Stay Heard on February 10, 2015. Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 3/23/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA(nms)
March 4, 2015 Set Answering Brief Deadline re (334 in 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 279 in 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 330 in 1:12-cv-01702-RGA) MOTION to Seal Confidential Portions of Transcript of Motion to Stay Heard on February 10, 2015. Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 3/23/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA(nms)
March 4, 2015 Filing 279 [SEALED] MOTION to Seal Confidential Portions of Transcript of Motion to Stay Heard on February 10, 2015 - filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, T-Moblie USA Inc., Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 3/6/2015 (nms).
March 4, 2015 Filing 279 [SEALED] MOTION to Seal Confidential Portions of Transcript of Motion to Stay Heard on February 10, 2015 - filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, T-Moblie USA Inc., Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 3/6/2015 (nms).
March 4, 2015 Filing 278 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Stephen J. Kraftschik, Esq. regarding AT&T, Sprint Spectrum, Sprint Communications, T-Mobile USA and Verizon Joinder to Google's Request for Oral Argument. (Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 3/4/2015 (nms).
March 4, 2015 Filing 278 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Stephen J. Kraftschik, Esq. regarding AT&T, Sprint Spectrum, Sprint Communications, T-Mobile USA and Verizon Joinder to Google's Request for Oral Argument. (Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 3/4/2015 (nms).
March 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 277 ORDER regarding CallWave's request for AT&T's indemnification documents that were withheld for privilege. CallWave's request for these documents is DENIED. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/4/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA(nms)
March 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 277 ORDER regarding CallWave's request for AT&T's indemnification documents that were withheld for privilege. CallWave's request for these documents is DENIED. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/4/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA(nms)
March 3, 2015 Filing 276 REDACTED VERSION of 269 Letter, by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-C)(Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 3/4/2015 (nms).
March 3, 2015 Filing 276 REDACTED VERSION of #269 Letter, by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-C)(Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 3/4/2015 (nms).
March 2, 2015 Filing 275 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding Request for Oral Argument. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
March 2, 2015 Filing 275 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding Request for Oral Argument. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
March 2, 2015 Filing 274 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Edmond D. Johnson regarding response to Karen Jacobs' February 24, 2015 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-C, #2 Exhibit D, #3 Exhibit E)(McMillan, James) Modified on 3/3/2015 (nms).
March 2, 2015 Filing 274 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Edmond D. Johnson regarding response to Karen Jacobs' February 24, 2015 Letter. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-C, # 2 Exhibit D, # 3 Exhibit E)(McMillan, James) Modified on 3/3/2015 (nms).
February 27, 2015 Filing 273 REPLY BRIEF re 237 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings for Invalidation of the Asserted Claims of the '970 Patent, filed by T-Moblie USA Inc.. (Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 3/3/2015 (nms).
February 27, 2015 Filing 273 REPLY BRIEF re #237 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings for Invalidation of the Asserted Claims of the '970 Patent, filed by T-Moblie USA Inc.. (Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 3/3/2015 (nms).
February 26, 2015 Filing 272 NOTICE OF SERVICE of T-Mobile USA Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's Second Individual Interrogatories to T-Mobile Relating to the '970 Track (2-3) re #228 Notice of Service filed by T-Moblie USA Inc..(Newell, Ryan)
February 26, 2015 Filing 272 NOTICE OF SERVICE of T-Mobile USA Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's Second Individual Interrogatories to T-Mobile Relating to the '970 Track (2-3) re 228 Notice of Service filed by T-Moblie USA Inc..(Newell, Ryan)
February 26, 2015 Filing 271 Official Transcript of Discovery Dispute held on 02-25-15 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leonard A. Dibbs. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/19/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/30/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/27/2015. (lad)
February 26, 2015 Filing 271 Official Transcript of Discovery Dispute held on 02-25-15 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leonard A. Dibbs. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/19/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/30/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/27/2015. (lad)
February 26, 2015 Filing 270 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Objections and Responses to Defendant T-Mobile USA Inc's First Set of Individual Interrogatories to Plaintiff Relating to the '970 Track (Nos. 1-7) filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
February 26, 2015 Filing 270 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Objections and Responses to Defendant T-Mobile USA Inc's First Set of Individual Interrogatories to Plaintiff Relating to the '970 Track (Nos. 1-7) filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
February 25, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Andrews - Discovery Conference was held on 2/25/2015. (Court Reporter Leonard Dibbs.) Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA(nms)
February 25, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Andrews - Discovery Conference was held on 2/25/2015. (Court Reporter Leonard Dibbs.) Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA(nms)
February 24, 2015 Filing 269 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Karen Jacobs regarding Status Report. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-C)(Jacobs, Karen)
February 24, 2015 Filing 269 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Karen Jacobs regarding Status Report. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-C)(Jacobs, Karen)
February 24, 2015 Filing 268 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Responses and Objections to Google's First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff Callwave Communications, LLC Relating to the '970 Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
February 24, 2015 Filing 268 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Responses and Objections to Google's First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff Callwave Communications, LLC Relating to the '970 Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
February 23, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (318 in 12-cv-01701-RGA, 267 in 12-cv-01703-RGA, 215 in 12-cv-01788-RGA, 293 in 12-cv-01704-RGA, 313 in 12-cv-01702-RGA) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME regarding Scheduling Order for the '970 Track to (see Stipulation), filed by Google Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/23/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
February 23, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (318 in 12-cv-01701-RGA, 267 in 12-cv-01703-RGA, 215 in 12-cv-01788-RGA, 293 in 12-cv-01704-RGA, 313 in 12-cv-01702-RGA) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME regarding Scheduling Order for the '970 Track to (see Stipulation), filed by Google Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/23/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
February 20, 2015 Filing 267 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME regarding Scheduling Order for the '970 Track to (see Stipulation) - filed by Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul)
February 20, 2015 Filing 267 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME regarding Scheduling Order for the '970 Track to (see Stipulation) - filed by Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul)
February 20, 2015 Filing 266 REDACTED VERSION of #255 Letter, by AT&T Mobility LLC, T-Moblie USA Inc., Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits G-Q)(Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 2/20/2015 (nms).
February 20, 2015 Filing 266 REDACTED VERSION of 255 Letter, by AT&T Mobility LLC, T-Moblie USA Inc., Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits G-Q)(Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 2/20/2015 (nms).
February 19, 2015 Filing 265 REDACTED VERSION of 251 Letter by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit F)(Johnson, Edmond)
February 19, 2015 Filing 265 REDACTED VERSION of #251 Letter by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit F)(Johnson, Edmond)
February 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 264 ORDER ruling on one of the pending discovery disputes (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/19/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA(nms)
February 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 264 ORDER ruling on one of the pending discovery disputes (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/19/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA(nms)
February 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 263 ORAL ORDER: Due to inclement weather the Discovery Conference set for 2/17/2015, was not able to proceed. The Court will now reschedule the Discovery Conference for 2/25/2015, at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/19/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA(nms)
February 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 263 ORAL ORDER: Due to inclement weather the Discovery Conference set for 2/17/2015, was not able to proceed. The Court will now reschedule the Discovery Conference for 2/25/2015, at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/19/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA(nms)
February 17, 2015 Filing 262 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Richard Sanders on March 16, 2015 filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
February 17, 2015 Filing 262 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Richard Sanders on March 16, 2015 filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
February 17, 2015 Filing 261 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Callwave Communications, LLC on March 20, 2015 filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Saindon, Paul)
February 17, 2015 Filing 261 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Callwave Communications, LLC on March 20, 2015 filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Saindon, Paul)
February 17, 2015 Filing 260 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Karen Jacobs regarding IPR Statistics. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-C)(Jacobs, Karen)
February 17, 2015 Filing 260 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Karen Jacobs regarding IPR Statistics. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-C)(Jacobs, Karen)
February 17, 2015 Filing 259 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Edmond D. Johnson regarding Court's Request on February 10, 2015 re IPR Statistics. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Johnson, Edmond)
February 17, 2015 Filing 259 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Edmond D. Johnson regarding Court's Request on February 10, 2015 re IPR Statistics. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Johnson, Edmond)
February 17, 2015 Filing 258 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 237 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings for Invalidation of the Asserted Claims of the '970 Patent filed by CallWave Communications LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 2/27/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Johnson, Edmond)
February 17, 2015 Filing 258 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #237 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings for Invalidation of the Asserted Claims of the '970 Patent filed by CallWave Communications LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 2/27/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Johnson, Edmond)
February 17, 2015 Filing 257 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Edmond D. Johnson, Esq. regarding Request for Oral Argument. (Johnson, Edmond) Modified on 2/18/2015 (nms).
February 17, 2015 Filing 257 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Edmond D. Johnson, Esq. regarding Request for Oral Argument. (Johnson, Edmond) Modified on 2/18/2015 (nms).
February 17, 2015 Filing 256 REDACTED VERSION of 247 Letter, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-I)(Johnson, Edmond) Modified on 2/18/2015 (nms).
February 17, 2015 Filing 256 REDACTED VERSION of #247 Letter, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-I)(Johnson, Edmond) Modified on 2/18/2015 (nms).
February 13, 2015 Filing 255 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Karen Jacobs, Benjamin J. Schladweiler and Ryan P. Newell regarding response to CallWave's February 12, 2015 Letter Brief - re (251 in 1:12-cv-01703-RGA) Letter. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit G-Q)(Jacobs, Karen)
February 13, 2015 Filing 255 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Karen Jacobs, Benjamin J. Schladweiler and Ryan P. Newell regarding response to CallWave's February 12, 2015 Letter Brief - re (251 in 1:12-cv-01703-RGA) Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit G-Q)(Jacobs, Karen)
February 12, 2015 Filing 254 REPLY BRIEF re 213 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings for Invalidation of the Asserted Claims of the '970 Patent filed by Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul)
February 12, 2015 Filing 254 REPLY BRIEF re #213 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings for Invalidation of the Asserted Claims of the '970 Patent filed by Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul)
February 12, 2015 Filing 253 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Callwave's Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews filed under seal, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Johnson, Edmond) Modified on 2/12/2015 (nms).
February 12, 2015 Filing 253 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Callwave's Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews filed under seal, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Johnson, Edmond) Modified on 2/12/2015 (nms).
February 12, 2015 Filing 252 EXHIBITS to 251 Letter, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Johnson, Edmond) Modified on 2/12/2015 (nms).
February 12, 2015 Filing 252 EXHIBITS to #251 Letter, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Johnson, Edmond) Modified on 2/12/2015 (nms).
February 12, 2015 Filing 251 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Edmond D. Johnson regarding February 17, 2015 discovery conference. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit F)(Johnson, Edmond) Modified on 2/12/2015 (nms).
February 12, 2015 Filing 251 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Edmond D. Johnson regarding February 17, 2015 discovery conference. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit F)(Johnson, Edmond) Modified on 2/12/2015 (nms).
February 11, 2015 Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines re (372 in 1:12-cv-01701-RGA) Redacted Transcript. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/11/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA et al.(rwc)
February 11, 2015 Filing 250 SEALED Official Transcript of Motion to Stay held on 02-10-15 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leonard A. Dibbs. (lad) Modified on 4/15/2015 (nms).
February 11, 2015 Filing 250 Official Transcript of Motion to Stay held on 02-10-15 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leonard A. Dibbs. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/4/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/16/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/12/2015. (lad)
February 10, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Andrews - Oral Argument held on 2/10/2015. (Court Reporter Leonard Dibbs.) Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(ksr, )
February 10, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Andrews - Oral Argument held on 2/10/2015. (Court Reporter Leonard Dibbs.) Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(ksr, )
February 9, 2015 Filing 249 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) T-Mobile USA Inc.'s First Supplemental Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's Second Collective Requests for Production to All '970 Track Defendants (27); and (2) T-Mobile USA Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's Second Requests for Production to T-Mobile Related to the '970 Track (2-11) filed by T-Moblie USA Inc..(Newell, Ryan)
February 9, 2015 Filing 249 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) T-Mobile USA Inc.'s First Supplemental Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's Second Collective Requests for Production to All '970 Track Defendants (27); and (2) T-Mobile USA Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's Second Requests for Production to T-Mobile Related to the '970 Track (2-11) filed by T-Moblie USA Inc..(Newell, Ryan)
February 9, 2015 Filing 248 EXHIBIT J to 247 Letter, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Johnson, Edmond) Modified on 2/9/2015 (nms).
February 9, 2015 Filing 248 EXHIBIT J to #247 Letter, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Johnson, Edmond) Modified on 2/9/2015 (nms).
February 9, 2015 Filing 247 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Edmond D. Johnson regarding response to the Defendants' February 6, 2015 Letter regarding response to the Court's January 28, 2015 Oral Order. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibits D through I, # 5 Certificate of Service)(Johnson, Edmond)
February 9, 2015 Filing 247 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Edmond D. Johnson regarding response to the Defendants' February 6, 2015 Letter regarding response to the Court's January 28, 2015 Oral Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibits D through I, #5 Certificate of Service)(Johnson, Edmond)
February 6, 2015 Filing 246 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Karen Jacobs regarding response to the Courts January 28, 2015 Oral Order. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-C)(Jacobs, Karen)
February 6, 2015 Filing 246 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Karen Jacobs regarding response to the Courts January 28, 2015 Oral Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-C)(Jacobs, Karen)
February 6, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (245 in 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 271 in 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 291 in 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 286 in 1:12-cv-01702-RGA) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Anup K. Misra and Anthony DeMarco Pesce of WINSTON & STRAWN LLP filed by Google Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/6/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(nms)
February 6, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (245 in 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 271 in 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 291 in 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 286 in 1:12-cv-01702-RGA) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Anup K. Misra and Anthony DeMarco Pesce of WINSTON & STRAWN LLP filed by Google Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/6/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(nms)
February 5, 2015 Filing 245 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Anup K. Misra and Anthony DeMarco Pesce of WINSTON & STRAWN LLP - filed by Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul)
February 5, 2015 Filing 245 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Anup K. Misra and Anthony DeMarco Pesce of WINSTON & STRAWN LLP - filed by Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul)
February 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ORAL ORDER: The parties have advised that a discovery dispute has arisen requiring judicial attention. The Court will hold a Discovery conference on 2/17/2015, at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews, to take up this issue. In preparation for this conference the parties shall follow the Discovery Matters and Disputes procedure as set forth in the Scheduling Order. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/5/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA(nms)
February 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ORAL ORDER: The parties have advised that a discovery dispute has arisen requiring judicial attention. The Court will hold a Discovery conference on 2/17/2015, at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews, to take up this issue. In preparation for this conference the parties shall follow the Discovery Matters and Disputes procedure as set forth in the Scheduling Order. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/5/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA(nms)
February 2, 2015 Filing 243 REDACTED VERSION of 230 Reply Brief, by AT & T Inc., AT & T Mobility LLC, Blackberry Corporation, Blackberry Limited, AT&T Inc., AT&T Mobility LLC, Google Inc., T-Moblie USA Inc., Cellco Partnership, Verizon Services Corp., Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 5-7)(Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 2/3/2015 (nms).
February 2, 2015 Filing 243 REDACTED VERSION of #230 Reply Brief, by AT & T Inc., AT & T Mobility LLC, Blackberry Corporation, Blackberry Limited, AT&T Inc., AT&T Mobility LLC, Google Inc., T-Moblie USA Inc., Cellco Partnership, Verizon Services Corp., Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 5-7)(Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 2/3/2015 (nms).
February 2, 2015 Filing 242 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) T-Mobile USA Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Requests for Production to T-Mobile related to the '970 Track (1); and (2) T-Mobile USA Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's Second Collective Requests for Production to All '970 Track Defendants (27) filed by T-Moblie USA Inc..(Newell, Ryan)
February 2, 2015 Filing 242 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) T-Mobile USA Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Requests for Production to T-Mobile related to the '970 Track (1); and (2) T-Mobile USA Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's Second Collective Requests for Production to All '970 Track Defendants (27) filed by T-Moblie USA Inc..(Newell, Ryan)
February 2, 2015 Filing 241 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 213 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings for Invalidation of the Asserted Claims of the '970 Patent filed by CallWave Communications LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 2/12/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(McMillan, James)
February 2, 2015 Filing 241 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #213 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings for Invalidation of the Asserted Claims of the '970 Patent filed by CallWave Communications LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 2/12/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(McMillan, James)
February 2, 2015 Filing 240 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Googles Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Callwave Communications, LLC's Second Collective Requests for Production to All Defendants Related to the '970 Track (No. 27) filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
February 2, 2015 Filing 240 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Googles Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Callwave Communications, LLC's Second Collective Requests for Production to All Defendants Related to the '970 Track (No. 27) filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
February 2, 2015 Filing 239 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Google Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Callwave Communications, LLC's Second Requests for Production to Google Inc. Related to the '970 Track (Nos. 17) filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
February 2, 2015 Filing 239 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Google Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Callwave Communications, LLC's Second Requests for Production to Google Inc. Related to the '970 Track (Nos. 17) filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
January 30, 2015 Filing 238 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #237 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings for Invalidation of the Asserted Claims of the '970 Patent filed by T-Moblie USA Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 2/17/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-B)(Kraftschik, Stephen)
January 30, 2015 Filing 238 OPENING BRIEF in Support re 237 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings for Invalidation of the Asserted Claims of the '970 Patent filed by T-Moblie USA Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 2/17/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-B)(Kraftschik, Stephen)
January 30, 2015 Filing 237 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings for Invalidation of the Asserted Claims of the '970 Patent - filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, T-Moblie USA Inc., Verizon Services Corp., Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Kraftschik, Stephen)
January 30, 2015 Filing 237 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings for Invalidation of the Asserted Claims of the '970 Patent - filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, T-Moblie USA Inc., Verizon Services Corp., Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Kraftschik, Stephen)
January 28, 2015 Filing 236 Request for International Judicial Assistance, Pursuant to the Hague Convention on the Taking of Evidence Abroad in Civil or Commercial Matters, to Obtain Evidence From Locationet Systems Ltd.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/28/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
January 28, 2015 Filing 236 Request for International Judicial Assistance, Pursuant to the Hague Convention on the Taking of Evidence Abroad in Civil or Commercial Matters, to Obtain Evidence From Locationet Systems Ltd.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/28/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
January 28, 2015 Filing 235 Request for International Judicial Assistance, Pursuant to the Hague Convention on the Taking of Evidence Abroad in Civil or Commercial Matters, to Obtain Evidence From MPD Technologies Ltd.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/28/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
January 28, 2015 Filing 235 Request for International Judicial Assistance, Pursuant to the Hague Convention on the Taking of Evidence Abroad in Civil or Commercial Matters, to Obtain Evidence From MPD Technologies Ltd.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/28/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
January 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 234 ORAL ORDER: The Motion to Issue Letters of Request for International Judicial Assistance Pursuant to the Hague Evidence Convention is Granted (see D.I. 211 in 12-cv-01704-RGA, D.I. 196 in 12-cv-01703-RGA, D.I. 169 in 12-cv-01788-RGA, D.I. 232 in 12-cv-01701-RGA, D.I. 227 in 12-cv-01702-RGA). Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/28/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
January 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 234 ORAL ORDER: The Motion to Issue Letters of Request for International Judicial Assistance Pursuant to the Hague Evidence Convention is Granted (see D.I. 211 in 12-cv-01704-RGA, D.I. 196 in 12-cv-01703-RGA, D.I. 169 in 12-cv-01788-RGA, D.I. 232 in 12-cv-01701-RGA, D.I. 227 in 12-cv-01702-RGA). Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/28/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
January 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ORAL ORDER: The Court will hear oral argument on the Renewed Motion to Stay Proceedings on the '970 Patent Pending Inter Partes Review by the Patent Trial and Appeal Board (see D.I. 228 in 12-cv-01701-RGA, D.I. 166 in 12-cv-01788-RGA, D.I. 207 in 12-cv-01704-RGA, D.I. 193 in 12-cv-01703-RGA, D.I. 223 in 12-cv-01702-RGA) on 2/10/2015, at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/28/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
January 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ORAL ORDER: The Court will hear oral argument on the Renewed Motion to Stay Proceedings on the '970 Patent Pending Inter Partes Review by the Patent Trial and Appeal Board (see D.I. 228 in 12-cv-01701-RGA, D.I. 166 in 12-cv-01788-RGA, D.I. 207 in 12-cv-01704-RGA, D.I. 193 in 12-cv-01703-RGA, D.I. 223 in 12-cv-01702-RGA) on 2/10/2015, at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/28/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
January 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ORAL ORDER: By no later than Feb. 6, 2015, all moving parties for the stay of the '970 track are requested to advise, if the stay were to be granted, whether the party would agree to be bound just as if it were the petitioner for the IPR, which, to the Court's understanding, would mean that the party could not raise any invalidity ground that was, or reasonably could have been, raised in the IPR, that is, section 102 & 103 arguments based on prior art consisting of patents or printed publications. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/28/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
January 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ORAL ORDER: By no later than Feb. 6, 2015, all moving parties for the stay of the '970 track are requested to advise, if the stay were to be granted, whether the party would agree to be bound just as if it were the petitioner for the IPR, which, to the Court's understanding, would mean that the party could not raise any invalidity ground that was, or reasonably could have been, raised in the IPR, that is, section 102 & 103 arguments based on prior art consisting of patents or printed publications. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/28/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
January 27, 2015 Filing 231 Official Transcript of Discovery Dispute held on 01-23-15 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leonard A. Dibbs. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/17/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/27/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/27/2015. (lad)
January 27, 2015 Filing 231 Official Transcript of Discovery Dispute held on 01-23-15 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leonard A. Dibbs. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/17/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/27/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/27/2015. (lad)
January 26, 2015 Filing 230 [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re #196 MOTION to Issue Letters of Request for International Judicial Assistance Pursuant to the Hague Evidence Convention filed by Google Inc., T-Moblie USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 5-7)(Kraftschik, Stephen)
January 26, 2015 Filing 230 [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re 196 MOTION to Issue Letters of Request for International Judicial Assistance Pursuant to the Hague Evidence Convention filed by Google Inc., T-Moblie USA Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 5-7)(Kraftschik, Stephen)
January 26, 2015 Filing 229 NOTICE OF SERVICE of T-Mobile USA Inc.'s First Set of Individual Interrogatories to Plaintiff Relating to the '970 Track (Nos. 1-7) filed by T-Moblie USA Inc..(Newell, Ryan)
January 26, 2015 Filing 229 NOTICE OF SERVICE of T-Mobile USA Inc.'s First Set of Individual Interrogatories to Plaintiff Relating to the '970 Track (Nos. 1-7) filed by T-Moblie USA Inc..(Newell, Ryan)
January 23, 2015 Filing 228 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Second Individual Interrogatories to T-Mobile USA Inc. Relating to the '970 Track (2-3) filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
January 23, 2015 Filing 228 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Second Individual Interrogatories to T-Mobile USA Inc. Relating to the '970 Track (2-3) filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
January 23, 2015 Filing 227 REDACTED VERSION of 215 Answering Brief in Opposition, by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James) Modified on 1/26/2015 (nms).
January 23, 2015 Filing 227 REDACTED VERSION of #215 Answering Brief in Opposition, by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James) Modified on 1/26/2015 (nms).
January 23, 2015 Filing 226 REDACTED VERSION of #210 Exhibit A in support of Declaration, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(McMillan, James) Modified on 1/23/2015 (nms).
January 23, 2015 Filing 226 REDACTED VERSION of 210 Exhibit A in support of Declaration, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(McMillan, James) Modified on 1/23/2015 (nms).
January 23, 2015 Filing 225 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Google Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff Callwave Communications, LLC Relating to the '970 Track filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
January 23, 2015 Filing 225 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Google Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff Callwave Communications, LLC Relating to the '970 Track filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
January 23, 2015 REDACTION NOTICE: In accordance with section G of the Administrative Procedures Governing Filing and Service by Electronic Means, redacted versions of sealed documents shall be filed electronically within 7 days of the filing of the sealed document. The records of this case do not reflect the filing of a redacted version of DI #210 . (nms)
January 23, 2015 REDACTION NOTICE: In accordance with section G of the Administrative Procedures Governing Filing and Service by Electronic Means, redacted versions of sealed documents shall be filed electronically within 7 days of the filing of the sealed document. The records of this case do not reflect the filing of a redacted version of DI # 210 . (nms)
January 23, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Andrews - Discovery Conference held on 1/23/2015. (Court Reporter Leonard Dibbs.) Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(ksr, )
January 23, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Andrews - Discovery Conference held on 1/23/2015. (Court Reporter Leonard Dibbs.) Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(ksr, )
January 22, 2015 Filing 224 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant T-Mobile USA Inc.'s Objections to Plaintiff's Notice of Deposition Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6), filed by T-Moblie USA Inc..(Newell, Ryan) Modified on 1/23/2015 (nms).
January 22, 2015 Filing 224 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant T-Mobile USA Inc.'s Objections to Plaintiff's Notice of Deposition Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6), filed by T-Moblie USA Inc..(Newell, Ryan) Modified on 1/23/2015 (nms).
January 22, 2015 Filing 223 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Edmond D. Johnson regarding fact discovery deadline. (Attachments: # 1 Exhbits A and B)(Johnson, Edmond)
January 22, 2015 Filing 223 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Edmond D. Johnson regarding fact discovery deadline. (Attachments: #1 Exhbits A and B)(Johnson, Edmond)
January 21, 2015 Filing 222 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Karen Jacobs regarding Defendants seek a modest two month extension of the February 25, 2015 fact discovery deadline. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Jacobs, Karen) (Main Document 222 replaced on 1/21/2015) (nms).
January 21, 2015 Filing 222 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Karen Jacobs regarding Defendants seek a modest two month extension of the February 25, 2015 fact discovery deadline. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Jacobs, Karen) (Main Document 222 replaced on 1/21/2015) (nms).
January 21, 2015 CORRECTING ENTRY: The main document pdf for the letter filed on 1/21/2015, has been swapped out with an amended version. The new version removes any reference to C.A. 13-711-RGA. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
January 21, 2015 CORRECTING ENTRY: The main document pdf for the letter filed on 1/21/2015, has been swapped out with an amended version. The new version removes any reference to C.A. 13-711-RGA. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
January 20, 2015 Filing 221 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Google's Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's Rule 30(b)(6) Notice of Deposition and Topics Related to the '970 Track and (2) Google's Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's Rule 30(b)(6) Notice of Deposition and Topics Related to the Call Processing Track filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
January 20, 2015 Filing 221 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Google's Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's Rule 30(b)(6) Notice of Deposition and Topics Related to the '970 Track and (2) Google's Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's Rule 30(b)(6) Notice of Deposition and Topics Related to the Call Processing Track filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
January 20, 2015 Filing 220 REQUEST for Oral Argument by Blackberry Corporation, Blackberry Limited, AT&T Mobility LLC, T-Moblie USA Inc., Verizon Services Corp., Google Inc., Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P. regarding Renewed Motion to Stay Proceedings on the '970 Patent Pending Inter Partes Review by the Patent Trial and Appeal Board. (Dellinger, Megan) Modified on 1/21/2015 (nms).
January 20, 2015 Filing 220 REQUEST for Oral Argument by Blackberry Corporation, Blackberry Limited, AT&T Mobility LLC, T-Moblie USA Inc., Verizon Services Corp., Google Inc., Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P. regarding Renewed Motion to Stay Proceedings on the '970 Patent Pending Inter Partes Review by the Patent Trial and Appeal Board. (Dellinger, Megan) Modified on 1/21/2015 (nms).
January 20, 2015 Filing 219 DECLARATION re 218 Reply Brief, by AT & T Inc., AT & T Mobility LLC, Blackberry Corporation, Blackberry Limited, AT&T Mobility LLC, Google Inc., T-Moblie USA Inc., Cellco Partnership, Verizon Services Corp., Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits D & E)(Dellinger, Megan) Modified on 1/21/2015 (nms).
January 20, 2015 Filing 219 DECLARATION re #218 Reply Brief, by AT & T Inc., AT & T Mobility LLC, Blackberry Corporation, Blackberry Limited, AT&T Mobility LLC, Google Inc., T-Moblie USA Inc., Cellco Partnership, Verizon Services Corp., Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits D & E)(Dellinger, Megan) Modified on 1/21/2015 (nms).
January 20, 2015 Filing 218 REPLY BRIEF re 193 Renewed Motion to Stay Proceedings on the '970 Patent Pending Inter Partes Review by the Patent Trial and Appeal Board, filed by Google Inc., T-Moblie USA Inc.. (Dellinger, Megan) Modified on 1/21/2015 (nms).
January 20, 2015 Filing 218 REPLY BRIEF re #193 Renewed Motion to Stay Proceedings on the '970 Patent Pending Inter Partes Review by the Patent Trial and Appeal Board, filed by Google Inc., T-Moblie USA Inc.. (Dellinger, Megan) Modified on 1/21/2015 (nms).
January 20, 2015 Filing 217 REDACTED VERSION of #207 Answering Brief in Opposition, by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James) Modified on 1/20/2015 (nms).
January 20, 2015 Filing 217 REDACTED VERSION of 207 Answering Brief in Opposition, by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James) Modified on 1/20/2015 (nms).
January 16, 2015 Filing 216 EXHIBIT A re 215 Answering Brief in Opposition, by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James) Modified on 1/20/2015 (nms).
January 16, 2015 Filing 216 EXHIBIT A re #215 Answering Brief in Opposition, by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James) Modified on 1/20/2015 (nms).
January 16, 2015 Filing 215 [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 196 MOTION to Issue Letters of Request for International Judicial Assistance Pursuant to the Hague Evidence Convention filed by CallWave Communications LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 1/26/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(McMillan, James)
January 16, 2015 Filing 215 [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #196 MOTION to Issue Letters of Request for International Judicial Assistance Pursuant to the Hague Evidence Convention filed by CallWave Communications LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 1/26/2015. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(McMillan, James)
January 16, 2015 Filing 214 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #213 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings for Invalidation of the Asserted Claims of the '970 Patent, filed by Google Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 2/2/2015. (Saindon, Paul) Modified on 1/16/2015 (nms).
January 16, 2015 Filing 214 OPENING BRIEF in Support re 213 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings for Invalidation of the Asserted Claims of the '970 Patent, filed by Google Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 2/2/2015. (Saindon, Paul) Modified on 1/16/2015 (nms).
January 16, 2015 Filing 213 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings for Invalidation of the Asserted Claims of the '970 Patent - filed by Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul) Modified on 1/16/2015 (nms).
January 16, 2015 Filing 213 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings for Invalidation of the Asserted Claims of the '970 Patent - filed by Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul) Modified on 1/16/2015 (nms).
January 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORAL ORDER: The parties have advised that a discovery dispute has arisen requiring judicial attention. The Court will hold a Discovery conference on 1/23/2015, at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews, to take up this issue. In preparation for this conference the parties shall follow the Discovery Matters and Disputes procedure as set forth in the Scheduling Order. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/14/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
January 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORAL ORDER: The parties have advised that a discovery dispute has arisen requiring judicial attention. The Court will hold a Discovery conference on 1/23/2015, at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews, to take up this issue. In preparation for this conference the parties shall follow the Discovery Matters and Disputes procedure as set forth in the Scheduling Order. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/14/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
January 14, 2015 Filing 211 Official Transcript of Markman Hearing held on 01-17-15 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leonard A. Dibbs. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/4/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/17/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/14/2015. (lad)
January 14, 2015 Filing 211 Official Transcript of Markman Hearing held on 01-17-15 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leonard A. Dibbs. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/4/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/17/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/14/2015. (lad)
January 14, 2015 CORRECTING ENTRY: The brief filed at D.I. 208 has been removed from the docket as it was a duplicate of the brief at D.I. #207 . (nms)
January 14, 2015 CORRECTING ENTRY: The brief filed at D.I. 208 has been removed from the docket as it was a duplicate of the brief at D.I. 207 . (nms)
January 13, 2015 Filing 210 [SEALED] EXHIBIT A re 209 Declaration, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(McMillan, James) Modified on 1/14/2015 (nms).
January 13, 2015 Filing 210 [SEALED] EXHIBIT A re #209 Declaration, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(McMillan, James) Modified on 1/14/2015 (nms).
January 13, 2015 Filing 209 DECLARATION of Leah McCoy re 207 Answering Brief in Opposition, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B, # 2 Exhibit C)(McMillan, James) Modified on 1/14/2015 (nms).
January 13, 2015 Filing 209 DECLARATION of Leah McCoy re #207 Answering Brief in Opposition, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit C)(McMillan, James) Modified on 1/14/2015 (nms).
January 13, 2015 Filing 207 [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 193 Renewed Motion to Stay Proceedings on the '970 Patent Pending Inter Partes Review by the Patent Trial and Appeal Board, filed by CallWave Communications LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 1/23/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(McMillan, James) Modified on 1/14/2015 (nms).
January 13, 2015 Filing 207 [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #193 Renewed Motion to Stay Proceedings on the '970 Patent Pending Inter Partes Review by the Patent Trial and Appeal Board, filed by CallWave Communications LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 1/23/2015. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(McMillan, James) Modified on 1/14/2015 (nms).
January 12, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (238 in 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 244 in 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 205 in 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 175 in 1:12-cv-01788-RGA, 221 in 1:12-cv-01704-RGA) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to file answering brief in opposition to Renewed Motion to Stay Proceedings on the '970 Patent to January 13, 2015, filed by CallWave Communications LLC (Reset Briefing Schedule: Answering Brief due 1/13/2015). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/12/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
January 12, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (238 in 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 244 in 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 205 in 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 175 in 1:12-cv-01788-RGA, 221 in 1:12-cv-01704-RGA) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to file answering brief in opposition to Renewed Motion to Stay Proceedings on the '970 Patent to January 13, 2015, filed by CallWave Communications LLC (Reset Briefing Schedule: Answering Brief due 1/13/2015). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/12/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
January 9, 2015 Filing 206 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding Callwave's Modified Proposal. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
January 9, 2015 Filing 206 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding Callwave's Modified Proposal. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
January 9, 2015 Filing 205 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Callwave to file its answering brief in opposition to Defendants' Renewed Motion to Stay Proceedings on the '970 Patent to January 13, 2015 - filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (Johnson, Edmond)
January 9, 2015 Filing 205 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Callwave to file its answering brief in opposition to Defendants' Renewed Motion to Stay Proceedings on the '970 Patent to January 13, 2015 - filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (Johnson, Edmond)
January 8, 2015 Filing 204 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Second Requests for Production to T-Mobile Related to the '970 Track (2-11) filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
January 8, 2015 Filing 204 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Second Requests for Production to T-Mobile Related to the '970 Track (2-11) filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
January 7, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Andrews - Markman Hearing held on 1/7/2015. (Court Reporter Leonard Dibbs.) Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA et al.(ksr, )
January 7, 2015 Filing 203 NOTICE of Subpoenas by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-7)(Kraftschik, Stephen)
January 7, 2015 Filing 203 NOTICE of Subpoenas by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-7)(Kraftschik, Stephen)
January 7, 2015 Filing 202 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Notice of Deposition to Defendant T-Mobile USA Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) for the '970 Track on January 23, 2015 filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
January 7, 2015 Filing 202 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Notice of Deposition to Defendant T-Mobile USA Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) for the '970 Track on January 23, 2015 filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
January 6, 2015 Filing 201 NOTICE of Subpoena upon Ericsson, Inc. by AT&T Mobility LLC(Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Schladweiler, Benjamin) Modified on 1/7/2015 (nms).
January 6, 2015 Filing 201 NOTICE of Subpoena upon Ericsson, Inc. by AT&T Mobility LLC(Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Schladweiler, Benjamin) Modified on 1/7/2015 (nms).
January 6, 2015 Filing 200 REDACTED VERSION of 196 MOTION to Issue Letters of Request for International Judicial Assistance Pursuant to the Hague Evidence Convention, by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-4)(Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 1/6/2015 (nms).
January 6, 2015 Filing 200 REDACTED VERSION of #196 MOTION to Issue Letters of Request for International Judicial Assistance Pursuant to the Hague Evidence Convention, by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-4)(Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 1/6/2015 (nms).
January 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORAL ORDER: Due to a scheduling conflict the Markman Hearing set for 1/7/2015, will now commence at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/6/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA et al.(nms)
January 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORAL ORDER: Due to a scheduling conflict the Markman Hearing set for 1/7/2015, will now commence at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/6/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA et al.(nms)
January 5, 2015 Filing 198 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Notice of Deposition to Defendant Google Inc. for the '970 Track on January 22, 2015 filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
January 5, 2015 Filing 198 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Notice of Deposition to Defendant Google Inc. for the '970 Track on January 22, 2015 filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
January 5, 2015 Filing 197 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's First Requests for Production to T-Mobile Related to the '970 Track (1) filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
January 5, 2015 Filing 197 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's First Requests for Production to T-Mobile Related to the '970 Track (1) filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
December 30, 2014 Set Answering Brief Deadline re (211 in 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 196 in 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 169 in 1:12-cv-01788-RGA, 232 in 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 227 in 1:12-cv-01702-RGA) MOTION to Issue Letters of Request for International Judicial Assistance Pursuant to the Hague Evidence Convention. Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 1/16/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
December 30, 2014 Set Answering Brief Deadline re (211 in 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 196 in 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 169 in 1:12-cv-01788-RGA, 232 in 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 227 in 1:12-cv-01702-RGA) MOTION to Issue Letters of Request for International Judicial Assistance Pursuant to the Hague Evidence Convention. Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 1/16/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
December 30, 2014 Filing 196 [SEALED] MOTION to Issue Letters of Request for International Judicial Assistance Pursuant to the Hague Evidence Convention - filed by AT & T Mobility LLC, Blackberry Corporation, Blackberry Limited, Google Inc., T-Moblie USA Inc., Cellco Partnership, Verizon Services Corp., Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-4)(Kraftschik, Stephen)
December 30, 2014 Filing 196 [SEALED] MOTION to Issue Letters of Request for International Judicial Assistance Pursuant to the Hague Evidence Convention - filed by AT & T Mobility LLC, Blackberry Corporation, Blackberry Limited, Google Inc., T-Moblie USA Inc., Cellco Partnership, Verizon Services Corp., Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-4)(Kraftschik, Stephen)
December 23, 2014 Filing 195 DECLARATION of Stephen J. Kraftschik re #193 Renewed Motion to Stay Proceedings on the '970 Patent Pending Inter Partes Review by the Patent Trial and Appeal Board, by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-C)(Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 1/4/2015 (nms).
December 23, 2014 Filing 195 DECLARATION of Stephen J. Kraftschik re 193 Renewed Motion to Stay Proceedings on the '970 Patent Pending Inter Partes Review by the Patent Trial and Appeal Board, by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-C)(Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 1/4/2015 (nms).
December 23, 2014 Filing 194 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #193 Renewed Motion to Stay Proceedings on the '970 Patent Pending Inter Partes Review by the Patent Trial and Appeal Board, filed by Google Inc., T-Moblie USA Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 1/9/2015. (Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 1/4/2015 (nms).
December 23, 2014 Filing 194 OPENING BRIEF in Support re 193 Renewed Motion to Stay Proceedings on the '970 Patent Pending Inter Partes Review by the Patent Trial and Appeal Board, filed by Google Inc., T-Moblie USA Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 1/9/2015. (Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 1/4/2015 (nms).
December 23, 2014 Filing 193 Renewed Motion to Stay Proceedings on the '970 Patent Pending Inter Partes Review by the Patent Trial and Appeal Board - filed by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 1/4/2015 (nms).
December 23, 2014 Filing 193 Renewed Motion to Stay Proceedings on the '970 Patent Pending Inter Partes Review by the Patent Trial and Appeal Board - filed by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 1/4/2015 (nms).
December 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER Regarding Claim Construction For US Patents 6,771,970 and 7,907,933. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/23/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
December 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER Regarding Claim Construction For US Patents 6,771,970 and 7,907,933. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/23/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
December 22, 2014 Filing 191 PROPOSED Claim Construction Order, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A, # 2 Appendix B)(Johnson, Edmond) Modified on 12/23/2014 (nms).
December 22, 2014 Filing 191 PROPOSED Claim Construction Order, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Appendix B)(Johnson, Edmond) Modified on 12/23/2014 (nms).
December 22, 2014 Filing 190 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Google's Responses to Plaintiff's Second Interrogatories to Google Relating to the '970 Track (Nos. 2-5) and (2) Google's Responses and Objections to Callwave Communications, LLC's First Requests for Production Related to the '970 Track (Nos. 1-16) filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
December 22, 2014 Filing 190 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Google's Responses to Plaintiff's Second Interrogatories to Google Relating to the '970 Track (Nos. 2-5) and (2) Google's Responses and Objections to Callwave Communications, LLC's First Requests for Production Related to the '970 Track (Nos. 1-16) filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
December 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 189 MEMORANDUM OPINION providing claim construction for the disputed terms. Within five days the parties shall submit a proposed order consistent with this Memorandum Opinion suitable for submission to the jury. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/17/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
December 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 189 MEMORANDUM OPINION providing claim construction for the disputed terms. Within five days the parties shall submit a proposed order consistent with this Memorandum Opinion suitable for submission to the jury. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/17/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
December 15, 2014 Filing 188 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Google's Responses to Plaintiff's Second Collective Interrogatories to the '933 Track Defendants (No. 8) and (2) Google's Responses to Plaintiff's Second Collective Interrogatories to the '970 Track Defendants (No. 8) filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
December 15, 2014 Filing 188 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Google's Responses to Plaintiff's Second Collective Interrogatories to the '933 Track Defendants (No. 8) and (2) Google's Responses to Plaintiff's Second Collective Interrogatories to the '970 Track Defendants (No. 8) filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
December 15, 2014 Filing 187 NOTICE OF SERVICE of T-Mobile USA, Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's Second Collective Interrogatories to '933 Track Defendants (8) and T-Mobile USA, Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's Second Collective Interrogatories to '970 Track Defendants (8) re #176 Notice of Service, #175 Notice of Service filed by T-Moblie USA Inc..(Connolly, Arthur)
December 15, 2014 Filing 187 NOTICE OF SERVICE of T-Mobile USA, Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's Second Collective Interrogatories to '933 Track Defendants (8) and T-Mobile USA, Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's Second Collective Interrogatories to '970 Track Defendants (8) re 176 Notice of Service, 175 Notice of Service filed by T-Moblie USA Inc..(Connolly, Arthur)
December 12, 2014 Filing 186 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove James F. Hurst as co-counsel.. (Saindon, Paul)
December 12, 2014 Filing 186 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove James F. Hurst as co-counsel.. (Saindon, Paul)
December 10, 2014 Filing 185 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Disclosure of Updated Infringement Contentions Against Google, Inc. filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
December 10, 2014 Filing 185 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Disclosure of Updated Infringement Contentions Against Google, Inc. filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
December 5, 2014 Pro Hac Vice Attorney LeinWeih A. Tseng for CallWave Communications LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA et al.(dmp, )
December 5, 2014 Pro Hac Vice Attorney LeinWeih A. Tseng for CallWave Communications LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA et al.(dmp, )
December 3, 2014 Filing 184 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney L. Andrew Tseng - filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James)
December 3, 2014 Filing 184 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney L. Andrew Tseng - filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James)
December 3, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (210 in 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 195 in 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 214 in 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 184 in 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 158 in 1:12-cv-01788-RGA, 115 in 1:13-cv-00711-RGA) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney L. Andrew Tseng filed by CallWave Communications LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/3/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA et al.(nms)
December 3, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (210 in 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 195 in 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 214 in 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 184 in 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 158 in 1:12-cv-01788-RGA, 115 in 1:13-cv-00711-RGA) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney L. Andrew Tseng filed by CallWave Communications LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/3/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA et al.(nms)
November 24, 2014 Filing 183 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Third Supplemental Responses to Defendants' First Set of Common Interrogatories Relating to the '970 Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
November 24, 2014 Filing 183 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Third Supplemental Responses to Defendants' First Set of Common Interrogatories Relating to the '970 Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
November 24, 2014 Filing 182 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Fourth Supplemental Responses to Defendants' First Set of Common Interrogatories Relating to the '933 Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
November 24, 2014 Filing 182 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Fourth Supplemental Responses to Defendants' First Set of Common Interrogatories Relating to the '933 Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
November 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER Granting Plaintiff Callwave Communications, LLC's Request To Allow An Exception To The Agreed Protective Order. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/19/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA(nms)
November 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER Granting Plaintiff Callwave Communications, LLC's Request To Allow An Exception To The Agreed Protective Order. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/19/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA(nms)
November 18, 2014 Filing 180 PROPOSED Order Granting Plaintiff Callwave Communications, LLCs Request to Allow an Exception to the Agreed Protective Order, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Johnson, Edmond) Modified on 11/19/2014 (nms).
November 18, 2014 Filing 180 PROPOSED Order Granting Plaintiff Callwave Communications, LLCs Request to Allow an Exception to the Agreed Protective Order, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Johnson, Edmond) Modified on 11/19/2014 (nms).
November 17, 2014 Filing 179 Official Transcript of Teleconference held on 11-14-14 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter/Transcriber Taneha Carroll. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/8/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/18/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/16/2015. (lad)
November 17, 2014 Filing 179 Official Transcript of Teleconference held on 11-14-14 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter/Transcriber Taneha Carroll. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/8/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/18/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/16/2015. (lad)
November 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORAL ORDER: The Court will hold a Telephone Conference today, 11/14/2014, at 3:00 PM before Judge Richard G. Andrews to take up the issues raised in the letters filed at D.I. 190 in 12-cv-1702-RGA, D.I. 169 in 12-cv-1703-RGA, D.I. 179 in 12-cv-1704-RGA, D.I.192 in 12-cv-1701-RGA, D.I. 170 in 12-cv-1703-RGA, D.I. 192 in 12-cv-1702-RGA, D.I. 194 in 12-cv-1701-RGA. The parties shall mutually coordinate the call to the Court. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/14/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(nms)
November 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORAL ORDER: The Court will hold a Telephone Conference today, 11/14/2014, at 3:00 PM before Judge Richard G. Andrews to take up the issues raised in the letters filed at D.I. 190 in 12-cv-1702-RGA, D.I. 169 in 12-cv-1703-RGA, D.I. 179 in 12-cv-1704-RGA, D.I.192 in 12-cv-1701-RGA, D.I. 170 in 12-cv-1703-RGA, D.I. 192 in 12-cv-1702-RGA, D.I. 194 in 12-cv-1701-RGA. The parties shall mutually coordinate the call to the Court. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/14/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(nms)
November 12, 2014 Filing 177 REDACTED VERSION of 170 Letter, by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 11/13/2014 (nms).
November 12, 2014 Filing 177 REDACTED VERSION of #170 Letter, by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 11/13/2014 (nms).
November 12, 2014 Filing 176 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Second Collective Interrogatories to '970 Track Defendants (8) filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
November 12, 2014 Filing 176 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Second Collective Interrogatories to '970 Track Defendants (8) filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
November 12, 2014 Filing 175 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Second Collective Interrogatories to '933 Track Defendants (8) filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
November 12, 2014 Filing 175 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Second Collective Interrogatories to '933 Track Defendants (8) filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
November 10, 2014 Filing 174 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Third Supplemental Responses to Defendants' First Set of Common Interrogatories Relating to the '933 Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
November 10, 2014 Filing 174 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Third Supplemental Responses to Defendants' First Set of Common Interrogatories Relating to the '933 Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
November 10, 2014 Filing 173 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Second Supplemental Responses to Defendants' First Set of Common Interrogatories Relating to the '970 Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
November 10, 2014 Filing 173 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Second Supplemental Responses to Defendants' First Set of Common Interrogatories Relating to the '970 Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
November 6, 2014 Filing 172 Official Transcript of Discovery Dispute held on 10-30-14 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leonard A. Dibbs. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/4/2015. (lad)
November 6, 2014 Filing 172 Official Transcript of Discovery Dispute held on 10-30-14 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leonard A. Dibbs. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/4/2015. (lad)
November 6, 2014 Filing 171 Official Transcript of Markman Hearing held on 10-29-14 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leonard A. Dibbs. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/4/2015. (lad)
November 6, 2014 Filing 171 Official Transcript of Markman Hearing held on 10-29-14 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leonard A. Dibbs. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/4/2015. (lad)
November 5, 2014 Filing 170 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Stephen J. Kraftschik regarding request for an exception to the agreed protective order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kraftschik, Stephen)
November 5, 2014 Filing 170 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Stephen J. Kraftschik regarding request for an exception to the agreed protective order. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Kraftschik, Stephen)
November 4, 2014 Filing 169 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from James G. McMillan, III regarding request for an exception to the agreed protective order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(McMillan, James)
November 4, 2014 Filing 169 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from James G. McMillan, III regarding request for an exception to the agreed protective order. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(McMillan, James)
October 30, 2014 Filing 168 REDACTED VERSION of 160 Appendix, by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 10/31/2014 (nms).
October 30, 2014 Filing 168 REDACTED VERSION of #160 Appendix, by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 10/31/2014 (nms).
October 30, 2014 Filing 167 REDACTED VERSION of 159 Letter, by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 10/31/2014 (nms).
October 30, 2014 Filing 167 REDACTED VERSION of #159 Letter, by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 10/31/2014 (nms).
October 30, 2014 Filing 166 REDACTED VERSION of #165 Letter, by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 10/31/2014 (nms).
October 30, 2014 Filing 166 REDACTED VERSION of 165 Letter, by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 10/31/2014 (nms).
October 30, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Andrews - Discovery Conference held on 10/30/2014. (Court Reporter Leonard Dibbs.) Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA et al.(ksr, )
October 30, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Andrews - Discovery Conference held on 10/30/2014. (Court Reporter Leonard Dibbs.) Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA et al.(ksr, )
October 29, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Andrews - Markman Hearing held on 10/29/2014. (Court Reporter Leonard Dibbs.) Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA et al.(ksr, )
October 29, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Andrews - Markman Hearing held on 10/29/2014. (Court Reporter Leonard Dibbs.) Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA et al.(ksr, )
October 29, 2014 Filing 165 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Karen Jacobs regarding response to CallWave's opening discovery dispute letter. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A & B)(Jacobs, Karen)
October 29, 2014 Filing 165 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Karen Jacobs regarding response to CallWave's opening discovery dispute letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A & B)(Jacobs, Karen)
October 29, 2014 Filing 164 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Paul Saindon regarding response to CallWave's motion to compel. (Saindon, Paul)
October 29, 2014 Filing 164 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Paul Saindon regarding response to CallWave's motion to compel. (Saindon, Paul)
October 29, 2014 Filing 163 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Edmond D. Johnson regarding Discovery Dispute. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Johnson, Edmond)
October 29, 2014 Filing 163 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Edmond D. Johnson regarding Discovery Dispute. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Johnson, Edmond)
October 29, 2014 Filing 162 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Edmond D. Johnson regarding Discovery Dispute. (Johnson, Edmond)
October 29, 2014 Filing 162 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Edmond D. Johnson regarding Discovery Dispute. (Johnson, Edmond)
October 28, 2014 Filing 161 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Edmond D. Johnson regarding Discovery Dispute. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Johnson, Edmond)
October 28, 2014 Filing 161 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Edmond D. Johnson regarding Discovery Dispute. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Johnson, Edmond)
October 28, 2014 Filing 160 [SEALED] APPENDIX re (103 in 1:13-cv-00711-RGA, 179 in 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 142 in 1:12-cv-01788-RGA, 181 in 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 159 in 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 169 in 1:12-cv-01704-RGA) Letter by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-18)(Jacobs, Karen)
October 28, 2014 Filing 160 [SEALED] APPENDIX re (103 in 1:13-cv-00711-RGA, 179 in 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 142 in 1:12-cv-01788-RGA, 181 in 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 159 in 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 169 in 1:12-cv-01704-RGA) Letter by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-18)(Jacobs, Karen)
October 28, 2014 Filing 159 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Karen Jacobs regarding discovery dispute. (Jacobs, Karen)
October 28, 2014 Filing 159 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Karen Jacobs regarding discovery dispute. (Jacobs, Karen)
October 28, 2014 Filing 158 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Paul Saindon regarding discovery dispute. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - 2)(Saindon, Paul)
October 28, 2014 Filing 158 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Paul Saindon regarding discovery dispute. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 2)(Saindon, Paul)
October 28, 2014 Filing 157 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Edmond D. Johnson regarding Discovery Disputes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Johnson, Edmond) Modified on 10/28/2014 (nms).
October 28, 2014 Filing 157 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Edmond D. Johnson regarding Discovery Disputes. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Johnson, Edmond) Modified on 10/28/2014 (nms).
October 27, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (178 in 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 166 in 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 156 in 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 176 in 1:12-cv-01702-RGA) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney George C. Lombardi filed by Google Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/27/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(nms)
October 27, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (178 in 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 166 in 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 156 in 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 176 in 1:12-cv-01702-RGA) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney George C. Lombardi filed by Google Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/27/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(nms)
October 24, 2014 Filing 156 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney George C. Lombardi - filed by Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul)
October 24, 2014 Filing 156 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney George C. Lombardi - filed by Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul)
October 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORAL ORDER: The discovery conference set by the Oral Order entered on 10/14/2014, (see 169 in 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 169 in 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 135 in 1:12-cv-01788-RGA, 135 in 1:12-cv-01788-RGA, 157 in 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 157 in 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 97 in 1:13-cv-00711-RGA, 97 in 1:13-cv-00711-RGA) will now commence at 8:30 a.m. in Courtroom 6A. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/24/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA et al.(nms)
October 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORAL ORDER: The discovery conference set by the Oral Order entered on 10/14/2014, (see 169 in 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 169 in 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 135 in 1:12-cv-01788-RGA, 135 in 1:12-cv-01788-RGA, 157 in 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 157 in 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 97 in 1:13-cv-00711-RGA, 97 in 1:13-cv-00711-RGA) will now commence at 8:30 a.m. in Courtroom 6A. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/24/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA et al.(nms)
October 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORAL ORDER: The parties have advised that the Google Defendant has a discovery dispute requiring judicial attention. The Court will hold a Discovery conference on 10/30/2014, at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews, to take up this issue. In preparation for this conference the parties shall follow the Discovery Matters and Disputes procedure as set forth in the Scheduling Order. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/24/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(nms)
October 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORAL ORDER: The parties have advised that the Google Defendant has a discovery dispute requiring judicial attention. The Court will hold a Discovery conference on 10/30/2014, at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews, to take up this issue. In preparation for this conference the parties shall follow the Discovery Matters and Disputes procedure as set forth in the Scheduling Order. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/24/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(nms)
October 24, 2014 Filing 153 Joint Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Paul Saindon on behalf of the parties regarding revised set of joint claim construction charts. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Saindon, Paul) Modified on 10/24/2014 (nms).
October 24, 2014 Filing 153 Joint Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Paul Saindon on behalf of the parties regarding revised set of joint claim construction charts. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Saindon, Paul) Modified on 10/24/2014 (nms).
October 23, 2014 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Charles F. Koch for CallWave Communications LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00711-RGA et al.(els)
October 23, 2014 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Charles F. Koch for CallWave Communications LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00711-RGA et al.(els)
October 21, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (172 in 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 162 in 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 152 in 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 174 in 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 138 in 1:12-cv-01788-RGA) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Charles F. Koch filed by CallWave Communications LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/21/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
October 21, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (172 in 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 162 in 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 152 in 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 174 in 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 138 in 1:12-cv-01788-RGA) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Charles F. Koch filed by CallWave Communications LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/21/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
October 20, 2014 Filing 152 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Charles F. Koch - filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (Johnson, Edmond)
October 20, 2014 Filing 152 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Charles F. Koch - filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (Johnson, Edmond)
October 20, 2014 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Juanita DeLoach for T-Moblie USA Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mas)
October 20, 2014 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Juanita DeLoach for T-Moblie USA Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mas)
October 17, 2014 Filing 151 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Juanita DeLoach - filed by T-Moblie USA Inc.. (Connolly, Arthur)
October 17, 2014 Filing 151 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Juanita DeLoach - filed by T-Moblie USA Inc.. (Connolly, Arthur)
October 17, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #151 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Juanita DeLoach filed by T-Moblie USA Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/17/2014. (nms)
October 17, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 151 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Juanita DeLoach filed by T-Moblie USA Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/17/2014. (nms)
October 16, 2014 Filing 150 NOTICE Of Service of Plaintiff Callwave Communications, LLCs Responses to Defendant T Mobile Usa, Inc.s First Set of Requests for Production Relating to the 970 Track (1-77), filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/16/2014 (nms).
October 16, 2014 Filing 150 NOTICE Of Service of Plaintiff Callwave Communications, LLCs Responses to Defendant T Mobile Usa, Inc.s First Set of Requests for Production Relating to the 970 Track (1-77), filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/16/2014 (nms).
October 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORAL ORDER: The parties have advised that a discovery dispute has arisen requiring judicial attention. The Court will hold a Discovery conference on 10/30/2014, at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews, to take up this issue. In preparation for this conference the parties shall follow the Discovery Matters and Disputes procedure as set forth in the Scheduling Order. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/14/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA(ksr, )
October 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORAL ORDER: The parties have advised that a discovery dispute has arisen requiring judicial attention. The Court will hold a Discovery conference on 10/30/2014, at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews, to take up this issue. In preparation for this conference the parties shall follow the Discovery Matters and Disputes procedure as set forth in the Scheduling Order. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/14/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA(ksr, )
October 14, 2014 Filing 148 APPENDIX re (D.I. 168 in 12-cv-01702-RGA, D.I. 134 in 12-cv-01788-RGA, D.I. 156 in 12-cv-01704-RGA, D.I. 168 in 12-cv-01701-RGA, D.I. 147 in 12-cv-01703-RGA) Joint Claim Construction Brief, by AT & T Mobility LLC, Blackberry Corporation, Blackberry Limited, AT&T Mobility LLC, Google Inc., T-Moblie USA Inc., Cellco Partnership, Verizon Services Corp., Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-5, Part1, #2 Exhibits 1-5, Part2, #3 Exhibits 6-7)(Saindon, Paul) Modified on 10/15/2014 (nms).
October 14, 2014 Filing 148 APPENDIX re (D.I. 168 in 12-cv-01702-RGA, D.I. 134 in 12-cv-01788-RGA, D.I. 156 in 12-cv-01704-RGA, D.I. 168 in 12-cv-01701-RGA, D.I. 147 in 12-cv-01703-RGA) Joint Claim Construction Brief, by AT & T Mobility LLC, Blackberry Corporation, Blackberry Limited, AT&T Mobility LLC, Google Inc., T-Moblie USA Inc., Cellco Partnership, Verizon Services Corp., Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-5, Part1, # 2 Exhibits 1-5, Part2, # 3 Exhibits 6-7)(Saindon, Paul) Modified on 10/15/2014 (nms).
October 14, 2014 CORRECTING ENTRY: The exhibits and two declarations attached to the Joint Claim Construction Brief filed on 10/9/2014, have been removed from that filing. Counsel shall refile these documents in a Joint Appendix and link it back to the Joint Brief it is in support of. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
October 14, 2014 CORRECTING ENTRY: The exhibits and two declarations attached to the Joint Claim Construction Brief filed on 10/9/2014, have been removed from that filing. Counsel shall refile these documents in a Joint Appendix and link it back to the Joint Brief it is in support of. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
October 9, 2014 Filing 147 Joint Claim Construction Brief, filed by Google Inc., T-Moblie USA Inc.. (Saindon, Paul) Modified on 10/14/2014 (nms).
October 9, 2014 Filing 147 Joint Claim Construction Brief, filed by Google Inc., T-Moblie USA Inc.. (Saindon, Paul) Modified on 10/14/2014 (nms).
October 6, 2014 Filing 146 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Peter Lambrianakos as co-counsel. Reason for request: no longer at Winston & Strawn LLP. (Saindon, Paul)
October 6, 2014 Filing 146 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Peter Lambrianakos as co-counsel. Reason for request: no longer at Winston & Strawn LLP. (Saindon, Paul)
October 2, 2014 Filing 145 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Sur-Reply Claim Construction Brief Relating to the '933 and '970 Patents filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
October 2, 2014 Filing 145 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Sur-Reply Claim Construction Brief Relating to the '933 and '970 Patents filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
September 30, 2014 Filing 144 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Supplemental Responses to Defendants' First Common Set of Interrogatories Relating to the '970 Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
September 30, 2014 Filing 144 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Supplemental Responses to Defendants' First Common Set of Interrogatories Relating to the '970 Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
September 30, 2014 Filing 143 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Second Supplemental Responses to Defendants' First Set of Common Interrogatories Relating to the '933 Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
September 30, 2014 Filing 143 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Second Supplemental Responses to Defendants' First Set of Common Interrogatories Relating to the '933 Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
September 29, 2014 Filing 142 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant T-Mobile USA, Inc.'s Objections and Third Supplemental Responses to Plaintiff's First Collective Interrogatories to '933 Track Defendants (1-7) re #62 Notice of Service, filed by T-Moblie USA Inc..(Newell, Ryan)
September 29, 2014 Filing 142 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant T-Mobile USA, Inc.'s Objections and Third Supplemental Responses to Plaintiff's First Collective Interrogatories to '933 Track Defendants (1-7) re 62 Notice of Service, filed by T-Moblie USA Inc..(Newell, Ryan)
September 29, 2014 Filing 141 NOTICE OF SERVICE of T-Mobile's First Supplemental Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories to T-Mobile USA, Inc. Relating to the '970 Track Defendants (1) and T-Mobile's Supplemental Responses to Plaintiff's First Collective Interrogatories to '970 Track Defendants (1-7) re 60 Notice of Service, 62 Notice of Service, filed by T-Moblie USA Inc..(Newell, Ryan)
September 29, 2014 Filing 141 NOTICE OF SERVICE of T-Mobile's First Supplemental Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories to T-Mobile USA, Inc. Relating to the '970 Track Defendants (1) and T-Mobile's Supplemental Responses to Plaintiff's First Collective Interrogatories to '970 Track Defendants (1-7) re #60 Notice of Service, #62 Notice of Service, filed by T-Moblie USA Inc..(Newell, Ryan)
September 23, 2014 Filing 140 REDACTED VERSION of 136 Letter, by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit E-H)(Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 9/23/2014 (nms).
September 23, 2014 Filing 140 REDACTED VERSION of #136 Letter, by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E-H)(Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 9/23/2014 (nms).
September 18, 2014 Filing 139 Official Transcript of Discovery Dispute held on 09-16-14 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leonard A. Dibbs. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/9/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/20/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/17/2014. (lad)
September 18, 2014 Filing 139 Official Transcript of Discovery Dispute held on 09-16-14 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leonard A. Dibbs. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/9/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/20/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/17/2014. (lad)
September 18, 2014 Filing 138 Official Transcript of Motion to Stay held on 09-16-14 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leonard A. Dibbs. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/9/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/20/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/17/2014. (lad)
September 18, 2014 Filing 138 Official Transcript of Motion to Stay held on 09-16-14 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leonard A. Dibbs. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/9/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/20/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/17/2014. (lad)
September 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORAL ORDER: The Motion to Stay Proceedings (D.I. #104 in No. 12-1701; D.I. #103 in No. 12-1702; D.I. #92 in No. 12-1703; D.I. #96 in No. 12-1704; and D.I. #86 in No. 12-1788) is DENIED for the reasons stated in open court. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/16/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(ksr, )
September 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORAL ORDER: The Motion to Stay Proceedings (D.I. 104 in No. 12-1701; D.I. 103 in No. 12-1702; D.I. 92 in No. 12-1703; D.I. 96 in No. 12-1704; and D.I. 86 in No. 12-1788) is DENIED for the reasons stated in open court. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/16/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(ksr, )
September 16, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Andrews - Discovery Conference held on 9/16/2014. (Court Reporter Leonard Dibbs.) Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA(ksr, )
September 16, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Andrews - Discovery Conference held on 9/16/2014. (Court Reporter Leonard Dibbs.) Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA(ksr, )
September 16, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Andrews - Oral Argument held on 9/16/2014. (Court Reporter Leonard Dibbs.) Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(ksr, )
September 16, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Andrews - Oral Argument held on 9/16/2014. (Court Reporter Leonard Dibbs.) Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(ksr, )
September 15, 2014 Filing 136 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Karen Jacobs regarding Discovery disputes - re (134 in 1:12-cv-01703-RGA) Letter. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit E through H)(Jacobs, Karen)
September 15, 2014 Filing 136 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Karen Jacobs regarding Discovery disputes - re (134 in 1:12-cv-01703-RGA) Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E through H)(Jacobs, Karen)
September 15, 2014 Filing 135 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant T-Mobile USA, Inc.'s First Set of Requests for Production to Plaintiff Relating to the '970 Track (1-77) filed by T-Moblie USA Inc..(Connolly, Arthur)
September 15, 2014 Filing 135 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant T-Mobile USA, Inc.'s First Set of Requests for Production to Plaintiff Relating to the '970 Track (1-77) filed by T-Moblie USA Inc..(Connolly, Arthur)
September 12, 2014 Filing 134 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Edmond D. Johnson regarding Discovery Dispute. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit D, #3 Certificate of Service)(Johnson, Edmond)
September 12, 2014 Filing 134 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Edmond D. Johnson regarding Discovery Dispute. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit D, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Johnson, Edmond)
September 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORAL ORDER: The parties have advised that discovery disputes have arisen requiring judicial attention. The Court will hold a Discovery Hearing on 9/16/2014, at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews, to take up this issue. In preparation for this conference the parties shall follow the Discovery Matters and Disputes procedure as set forth in the Scheduling Order. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/10/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA et al.(nms)
September 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORAL ORDER: The parties have advised that discovery disputes have arisen requiring judicial attention. The Court will hold a Discovery Hearing on 9/16/2014, at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews, to take up this issue. In preparation for this conference the parties shall follow the Discovery Matters and Disputes procedure as set forth in the Scheduling Order. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/10/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA et al.(nms)
September 9, 2014 Filing 132 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Preliminary List of Claim Terms that Require Construction for the Call Processing Track filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
September 9, 2014 Filing 132 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Preliminary List of Claim Terms that Require Construction for the Call Processing Track filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
September 5, 2014 Filing 131 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) Callwave Communications, LLC's Opening Claim Construction Brief; 2) Declaration of David Kotz, Ph.D.; and 3) Declaration of Jeffrey J. Evans, Ph.D. filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
September 5, 2014 Filing 131 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) Callwave Communications, LLC's Opening Claim Construction Brief; 2) Declaration of David Kotz, Ph.D.; and 3) Declaration of Jeffrey J. Evans, Ph.D. filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
September 4, 2014 Filing 130 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) Callwave Communications, LLC's Responses to Defendants' Second Set of Common Interrogatories Relating to the '933 Track; and 2) Callwave Communications, LLC's Responses to Defendants' Second Set of Common Interrogatories Relating to the '970 Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
September 4, 2014 Filing 130 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) Callwave Communications, LLC's Responses to Defendants' Second Set of Common Interrogatories Relating to the '933 Track; and 2) Callwave Communications, LLC's Responses to Defendants' Second Set of Common Interrogatories Relating to the '970 Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
August 27, 2014 Filing 129 NOTICE of Subpoena upon David Hofstatter by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Kraftschik, Stephen)
August 27, 2014 Filing 129 NOTICE of Subpoena upon David Hofstatter by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Kraftschik, Stephen)
August 22, 2014 Filing 128 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant T-Mobile USA, Inc.'s Objections and Second Supplemental Responses to Plaintiff's First Collective Interrogatories to 933 Track Defendants (1-7) filed by T-Moblie USA Inc..(Newell, Ryan)
August 22, 2014 Filing 128 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant T-Mobile USA, Inc.'s Objections and Second Supplemental Responses to Plaintiff's First Collective Interrogatories to 933 Track Defendants (1-7) filed by T-Moblie USA Inc..(Newell, Ryan)
August 21, 2014 Filing 127 NOTICE of Subpoenas, by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-6)(Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 8/25/2014 (nms).
August 21, 2014 Filing 127 NOTICE of Subpoenas, by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-6)(Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 8/25/2014 (nms).
August 15, 2014 Filing 126 Joint APPENDIX, Vol. II of II re Claim Construction Chart, by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James) Modified on 8/15/2014 (nms).
August 15, 2014 Filing 126 Joint APPENDIX, Vol. II of II re Claim Construction Chart, by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James) Modified on 8/15/2014 (nms).
August 15, 2014 Filing 125 Joint APPENDIX, Vol. I of II, re Claim Construction Chart, by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James) Modified on 8/15/2014 (nms).
August 15, 2014 Filing 125 Joint APPENDIX, Vol. I of II, re Claim Construction Chart, by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James) Modified on 8/15/2014 (nms).
August 15, 2014 CORRECTING ENTRY: The Joint Appendix entries filed on 8/15/2014, have been removed from the dockets. The filings were not formatted appropriately with proper cover pages providing the case caption and titles (Volumes I and II) for the filings. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
August 15, 2014 CORRECTING ENTRY: The Joint Appendix entries filed on 8/15/2014, have been removed from the dockets. The filings were not formatted appropriately with proper cover pages providing the case caption and titles (Volumes I and II) for the filings. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
August 14, 2014 Filing 124 CLAIM Construction Chart for the '970 Track, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(McMillan, James) Modified on 8/15/2014 (nms).
August 14, 2014 Filing 124 CLAIM Construction Chart for the '970 Track, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(McMillan, James) Modified on 8/15/2014 (nms).
August 14, 2014 Filing 123 CLAIM Construction Chart for '933 Track, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(McMillan, James) Modified on 8/15/2014 (nms).
August 14, 2014 Filing 123 CLAIM Construction Chart for '933 Track, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(McMillan, James) Modified on 8/15/2014 (nms).
August 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORAL ORDER: The Court will hear oral argument on the MOTION to Stay Proceedings on the '970 Patent Pending Inter Partes Review by the Patent Trial and Appeal Board (see D.I. 103 in 12-cv-01702-RGA, D.I. 96 in 12-cv-01704-RGA, D.I. 92 in 12-cv-01703-RGA, D.I. 104 in 12-cv-01701-RGA, D.I. 86 in 12-cv-01788-RGA) on 9/16/2014, at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/7/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
August 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORAL ORDER: The Court will hear oral argument on the MOTION to Stay Proceedings on the '970 Patent Pending Inter Partes Review by the Patent Trial and Appeal Board (see D.I. 103 in 12-cv-01702-RGA, D.I. 96 in 12-cv-01704-RGA, D.I. 92 in 12-cv-01703-RGA, D.I. 104 in 12-cv-01701-RGA, D.I. 86 in 12-cv-01788-RGA) on 9/16/2014, at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/7/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
August 6, 2014 Filing 121 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Supplemental Responses to Defendants' First Set of Common Interrogatories Relating to the '933 Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
August 6, 2014 Filing 121 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Supplemental Responses to Defendants' First Set of Common Interrogatories Relating to the '933 Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
August 4, 2014 Filing 120 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendants' Second Set of Common Interrogatories to Plaintiff Relating to the '933 Track (No. 7); and (2) Defendants' Second Common Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff Relating to the '970 Track (No. 9) filed by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P..(Kraftschik, Stephen)
August 4, 2014 Filing 120 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendants' Second Set of Common Interrogatories to Plaintiff Relating to the '933 Track (No. 7); and (2) Defendants' Second Common Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff Relating to the '970 Track (No. 9) filed by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P..(Kraftschik, Stephen)
August 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER Granting (114 in 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 77 in 1:13-cv-00711-RGA, 131 in 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 110 in 1:12-cv-01788-RGA, 124 in 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 132 in 1:12-cv-01701-RGA) Proposed Agreed Protective Order, filed by CallWave Communications LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/4/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA et al.(nms)
August 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER Granting (114 in 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 77 in 1:13-cv-00711-RGA, 131 in 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 110 in 1:12-cv-01788-RGA, 124 in 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 132 in 1:12-cv-01701-RGA) Proposed Agreed Protective Order, filed by CallWave Communications LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/4/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA et al.(nms)
August 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 118 SO ORDERED Granting (106 in 1:12-cv-01788-RGA, 127 in 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 111 in 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 120 in 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 74 in 1:13-cv-00711-RGA) Proposed Order Regarding Discovery, Including Discovery of Electronically Stored Information ("ESI"), filed by Google Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/4/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA, 1:13-cv-00711-RGA(nms)
August 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 118 SO ORDERED Granting (106 in 1:12-cv-01788-RGA, 127 in 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 111 in 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 120 in 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 74 in 1:13-cv-00711-RGA) Proposed Order Regarding Discovery, Including Discovery of Electronically Stored Information ("ESI"), filed by Google Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/4/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA, 1:13-cv-00711-RGA(nms)
August 4, 2014 Filing 117 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Shailendra K. Maheshwari as co-counsel. Reason for request: No longer participating in the representation of T-Mobile. (Connolly, Arthur)
August 4, 2014 Filing 117 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Shailendra K. Maheshwari as co-counsel. Reason for request: No longer participating in the representation of T-Mobile. (Connolly, Arthur)
August 1, 2014 Filing 116 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) Callwave Communications, LLC's Initial Proposed Claim Constructions for the '970 Track and 2) Callwave Communications, LLC's Initial Proposed Claim Constructions for the '933 Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
August 1, 2014 Filing 116 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) Callwave Communications, LLC's Initial Proposed Claim Constructions for the '970 Track and 2) Callwave Communications, LLC's Initial Proposed Claim Constructions for the '933 Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
July 31, 2014 Filing 115 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendants' Initial Proposed Claim Constructions Relating to the '933 Patent; and (2) Defendants' Initial Proposed Claim Constructions Relating to the '970 Patent filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
July 31, 2014 Filing 115 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendants' Initial Proposed Claim Constructions Relating to the '933 Patent; and (2) Defendants' Initial Proposed Claim Constructions Relating to the '970 Patent filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
July 28, 2014 Filing 114 PROPOSED Stipulated Protective Order, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Johnson, Edmond) Modified on 7/29/2014 (nms).
July 28, 2014 Filing 114 PROPOSED Stipulated Protective Order, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Johnson, Edmond) Modified on 7/29/2014 (nms).
July 21, 2014 Filing 113 REQUEST for Oral Argument by AT & T Mobility LLC, Blackberry Corporation, Blackberry Limited, AT&T Inc., AT&T Mobility LLC, Google Inc., T-Moblie USA Inc., Cellco Partnership, Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P. re 92 MOTION to Stay. (Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 7/22/2014 (nms).
July 21, 2014 Filing 113 REQUEST for Oral Argument by AT & T Mobility LLC, Blackberry Corporation, Blackberry Limited, AT&T Inc., AT&T Mobility LLC, Google Inc., T-Moblie USA Inc., Cellco Partnership, Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P. re #92 MOTION to Stay. (Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 7/22/2014 (nms).
July 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORAL ORDER: On the Letter, Exhibit A (see D.I. 70 in 13-cv-00711-RGA, D.I. 104 in 12-cv-01703-RGA, D.I. 112 in 12-cv-01704-RGA, D.I. 119 in 12-cv-01701-RGA, D.I. 119 in 12-cv-01702-RGA, D.I. 98 in 12-cv-01788-RGA), the Court prefers the more narrowly tailored CallWave position. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/17/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA et al.(nms)
July 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORAL ORDER: On the Letter, Exhibit A (see D.I. 70 in 13-cv-00711-RGA, D.I. 104 in 12-cv-01703-RGA, D.I. 112 in 12-cv-01704-RGA, D.I. 119 in 12-cv-01701-RGA, D.I. 119 in 12-cv-01702-RGA, D.I. 98 in 12-cv-01788-RGA), the Court prefers the more narrowly tailored CallWave position. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/17/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA et al.(nms)
July 16, 2014 Filing 111 Proposed Order Regarding Discovery, Including Discovery of Electronically Stored Information ("ESI"), by Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul) Modified on 7/17/2014 (nms).
July 16, 2014 Filing 111 Proposed Order Regarding Discovery, Including Discovery of Electronically Stored Information ("ESI"), by Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul) Modified on 7/17/2014 (nms).
July 15, 2014 Filing 110 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Paul Saindon regarding the proposed Protective Order and in response to CallWave's letter dated July 7, 2014. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-2)(Saindon, Paul)
July 15, 2014 Filing 110 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Paul Saindon regarding the proposed Protective Order and in response to CallWave's letter dated July 7, 2014. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-2)(Saindon, Paul)
July 14, 2014 Filing 109 REPLY BRIEF re #92 MOTION to Stay Proceedings on the '970 Patent Pending Inter Partes Review by the Patent Trial and Appeal Board filed by Google Inc., T-Moblie USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Dellinger, Megan)
July 14, 2014 Filing 109 REPLY BRIEF re 92 MOTION to Stay Proceedings on the '970 Patent Pending Inter Partes Review by the Patent Trial and Appeal Board filed by Google Inc., T-Moblie USA Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Dellinger, Megan)
July 11, 2014 Filing 108 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Callwave Communications, LLC's List of Claim Terms for which Constructions Will Be Proposed filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
July 11, 2014 Filing 108 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Callwave Communications, LLC's List of Claim Terms for which Constructions Will Be Proposed filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
July 10, 2014 Filing 107 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendants' Preliminary List of Claim Terms that Require Construction and/or are Indefinite for the '933 Track; and (2) Defendants' Preliminary List of Claim Terms that Require Construction and/or are Indefinite for the '970 Track filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
July 10, 2014 Filing 107 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendants' Preliminary List of Claim Terms that Require Construction and/or are Indefinite for the '933 Track; and (2) Defendants' Preliminary List of Claim Terms that Require Construction and/or are Indefinite for the '970 Track filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
July 10, 2014 Filing 106 Official Transcript of Discovery Dispute held on 07-08-14 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leonard A. Dibbs. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/31/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/11/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/8/2014. (lad)
July 10, 2014 Filing 106 Official Transcript of Discovery Dispute held on 07-08-14 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leonard A. Dibbs. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/31/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/11/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/8/2014. (lad)
July 8, 2014 Filing 105 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Lauren Reznick as co-counsel. Reason for request: No longer with the firm.. (McMillan, James)
July 8, 2014 Filing 105 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Lauren Reznick as co-counsel. Reason for request: No longer with the firm.. (McMillan, James)
July 8, 2014 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Gregory S. Bishop for CallWave Communications LLC added for electronic noticing. (dmp, )
July 8, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Andrews - Discovery Conference held on 7/8/2014. (Court Reporter Leonard Dibbs.) Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA et al.(ksr, )
July 8, 2014 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Gregory S. Bishop for CallWave Communications LLC added for electronic noticing. (dmp, )
July 8, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Andrews - Discovery Conference held on 7/8/2014. (Court Reporter Leonard Dibbs.) Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA et al.(ksr, )
July 7, 2014 Filing 104 Letter to Honorable Richard G. Andrews from James G. McMillan, III regarding Protective Order. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-B)(McMillan, James) Modified on 7/8/2014 (nms).
July 7, 2014 Filing 104 Letter to Honorable Richard G. Andrews from James G. McMillan, III regarding Protective Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(McMillan, James) Modified on 7/8/2014 (nms).
July 7, 2014 Filing 103 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from James G. McMillan, III regarding CallWave Communications, LLC's Response to Defendants' July 3, 2014 letter. (McMillan, James) Modified on 7/8/2014 (nms).
July 7, 2014 Filing 103 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from James G. McMillan, III regarding CallWave Communications, LLC's Response to Defendants' July 3, 2014 letter. (McMillan, James) Modified on 7/8/2014 (nms).
July 7, 2014 Filing 102 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding discovery dispute. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-B)(Blumenfeld, Jack)
July 7, 2014 Filing 102 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding discovery dispute. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-B)(Blumenfeld, Jack)
July 3, 2014 Filing 101 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 92 MOTION to Stay Proceedings on the '970 Patent Pending Inter Partes Review by the Patent Trial and Appeal Board, filed by CallWave Communications LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 7/14/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-E, # 2 Exhibits F-I, # 3 Exhibits J-L, # 4 Certificate of Serviice)(McMillan, James) Modified on 7/8/2014 (nms).
July 3, 2014 Filing 101 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #92 MOTION to Stay Proceedings on the '970 Patent Pending Inter Partes Review by the Patent Trial and Appeal Board, filed by CallWave Communications LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 7/14/2014. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-E, #2 Exhibits F-I, #3 Exhibits J-L, #4 Certificate of Serviice)(McMillan, James) Modified on 7/8/2014 (nms).
July 3, 2014 Filing 100 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from James G. McMillan, III regarding Discovery Dispute. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-F)(McMillan, James) Modified on 7/8/2014 (nms).
July 3, 2014 Filing 100 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from James G. McMillan, III regarding Discovery Dispute. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-F)(McMillan, James) Modified on 7/8/2014 (nms).
July 3, 2014 Filing 99 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding discovery dispute. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
July 3, 2014 Filing 99 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding discovery dispute. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
July 1, 2014 Filing 98 NOTICE of Subpoena on Vipul Sawhney by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Subpoena)(Saindon, Paul)
July 1, 2014 Filing 98 NOTICE of Subpoena on Vipul Sawhney by Google Inc. (Attachments: #1 Subpoena)(Saindon, Paul)
June 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORAL ORDER: The parties have advised that a discovery dispute has arisen requiring judicial attention. The Court will hold a Discovery conference on 7/8/2014, at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews to take up this issue. In preparation for this conference the parties shall follow the Discovery Matters and Disputes procedure as set forth in the Scheduling Order. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/26/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA et al.(nms)
June 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORAL ORDER: The parties have advised that a discovery dispute has arisen requiring judicial attention. The Court will hold a Discovery conference on 7/8/2014, at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews to take up this issue. In preparation for this conference the parties shall follow the Discovery Matters and Disputes procedure as set forth in the Scheduling Order. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/26/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA et al.(nms)
June 20, 2014 Filing 96 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Amended Disclosure of Defendant Google Inc. Pursuant to Paragraph 3.A of the Proposed Order Regarding Discovery filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
June 20, 2014 Filing 96 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Amended Disclosure of Defendant Google Inc. Pursuant to Paragraph 3.A of the Proposed Order Regarding Discovery filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
June 20, 2014 Filing 95 NOTICE of Subpoenas on Fuze Box, Inc. and FuzeBox Software Corp. by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-4)(Saindon, Paul)
June 20, 2014 Filing 95 NOTICE of Subpoenas on Fuze Box, Inc. and FuzeBox Software Corp. by Google Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-4)(Saindon, Paul)
June 17, 2014 Filing 94 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Gregory S. Bishop - filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Edmond)
June 17, 2014 Filing 94 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Gregory S. Bishop - filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Edmond)
June 17, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (94 in 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 99 in 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 105 in 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 88 in 1:12-cv-01788-RGA, 106 in 1:12-cv-01701-RGA) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Gregory S. Bishop filed by CallWave Communications LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/17/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
June 17, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (94 in 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 99 in 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 105 in 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 88 in 1:12-cv-01788-RGA, 106 in 1:12-cv-01701-RGA) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Gregory S. Bishop filed by CallWave Communications LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/17/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
June 16, 2014 Filing 93 OPENING BRIEF in Support re 92 MOTION to Stay Proceedings on the '970 Patent Pending Inter Partes Review by the Patent Trial and Appeal Board, filed by Google Inc., T-Moblie USA Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 7/3/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-6)(Dellinger, Megan) Modified on 6/17/2014 (nms).
June 16, 2014 Filing 93 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #92 MOTION to Stay Proceedings on the '970 Patent Pending Inter Partes Review by the Patent Trial and Appeal Board, filed by Google Inc., T-Moblie USA Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 7/3/2014. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-6)(Dellinger, Megan) Modified on 6/17/2014 (nms).
June 16, 2014 Filing 92 MOTION to Stay Proceedings on the '970 Patent Pending Inter Partes Review by the Patent Trial and Appeal Board - filed by AT & T Mobility LLC, Blackberry Corporation, Blackberry Limited, AT&T Mobility LLC, Google Inc., T-Moblie USA Inc., Cellco Partnership, Verizon Communications Inc., Sprint Nextel Corp.. (Dellinger, Megan) Modified on 6/17/2014 (nms).
June 16, 2014 Filing 92 MOTION to Stay Proceedings on the '970 Patent Pending Inter Partes Review by the Patent Trial and Appeal Board - filed by AT & T Mobility LLC, Blackberry Corporation, Blackberry Limited, AT&T Mobility LLC, Google Inc., T-Moblie USA Inc., Cellco Partnership, Verizon Communications Inc., Sprint Nextel Corp.. (Dellinger, Megan) Modified on 6/17/2014 (nms).
May 30, 2014 Filing 91 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendant T-Mobile USA, Inc.'s Objections and First Supplemental Responses to Plaintiff's First Interrogatories to T-Mobile USA, Inc. Regarding the 933 Track (1); and (2) Defendant T-Mobile USA, Inc.'s Objections and First Supplemental Responses to Plaintiff's First Collective Interrogatories to '933 Track Defendants (1-7) filed by T-Moblie USA Inc..(Newell, Ryan)
May 30, 2014 Filing 91 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendant T-Mobile USA, Inc.'s Objections and First Supplemental Responses to Plaintiff's First Interrogatories to T-Mobile USA, Inc. Regarding the 933 Track (1); and (2) Defendant T-Mobile USA, Inc.'s Objections and First Supplemental Responses to Plaintiff's First Collective Interrogatories to '933 Track Defendants (1-7) filed by T-Moblie USA Inc..(Newell, Ryan)
May 16, 2014 Filing 90 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendants' Initial Invalidity Contentions on the '933 Patent and (2) Defendants' Initial Invalidity Contentions the '970 patent filed by Sprint Nextel Corp..(Kraftschik, Stephen)
May 16, 2014 Filing 90 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendants' Initial Invalidity Contentions on the '933 Patent and (2) Defendants' Initial Invalidity Contentions the '970 patent filed by Sprint Nextel Corp..(Kraftschik, Stephen)
May 13, 2014 Filing 89 NOTICE Of Service of Callwave Communications, LLC's Subpoena to Amdocs, Inc. and Danal Inc., d/b/a Billtomobile, filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(McMillan, James) Modified on 5/14/2014 (nms).
May 13, 2014 Filing 89 NOTICE Of Service of Callwave Communications, LLC's Subpoena to Amdocs, Inc. and Danal Inc., d/b/a Billtomobile, filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(McMillan, James) Modified on 5/14/2014 (nms).
May 8, 2014 Filing 88 NOTICE OF SERVICE of CallWave Communications, LLC's Responses to Google's First Set of Requests for Production to Plaintiff Relating to the '933 Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
May 8, 2014 Filing 88 NOTICE OF SERVICE of CallWave Communications, LLC's Responses to Google's First Set of Requests for Production to Plaintiff Relating to the '933 Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
April 24, 2014 Filing 87 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Benjamin Snitkoff as co-counsel. Reason for request: no longer with the firm. (Johnson, Edmond)
April 24, 2014 Filing 87 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Benjamin Snitkoff as co-counsel. Reason for request: no longer with the firm. (Johnson, Edmond)
April 15, 2014 Filing 86 NOTICE OF SERVICE of CallWave Communications, LLC's Disclosures of Infringement Contentions Relating to the '933 Track and '970 Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
April 15, 2014 Filing 86 NOTICE OF SERVICE of CallWave Communications, LLC's Disclosures of Infringement Contentions Relating to the '933 Track and '970 Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
April 9, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Andrews - Discovery Conference held on 4/9/2014. (Court Reporter Heather Triozzi - Hawkins Reporting Service.) Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA et al.(ksr, )
April 9, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Andrews - Discovery Conference held on 4/9/2014. (Court Reporter Heather Triozzi - Hawkins Reporting Service.) Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA et al.(ksr, )
April 8, 2014 Filing 85 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from James G. McMillan, III regarding Discovery Dispute - re (84 in 1:12-cv-01703-RGA) Letter. (McMillan, James)
April 8, 2014 Filing 85 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from James G. McMillan, III regarding Discovery Dispute - re (84 in 1:12-cv-01703-RGA) Letter. (McMillan, James)
April 7, 2014 Filing 84 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Paul Saindon regarding Protective Order and ESI Order Disputes. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-10)(Saindon, Paul)
April 7, 2014 Filing 84 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Paul Saindon regarding Protective Order and ESI Order Disputes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-10)(Saindon, Paul)
April 4, 2014 Filing 83 NOTICE OF SERVICE of T-Mobile's Paragraph 3 Disclosures Regarding the '933 Track filed by T-Moblie USA Inc..(Connolly, Arthur)
April 4, 2014 Filing 83 NOTICE OF SERVICE of T-Mobile's Paragraph 3 Disclosures Regarding the '933 Track filed by T-Moblie USA Inc..(Connolly, Arthur)
April 4, 2014 Filing 82 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) CallWave Communications, LLC's Responses to Defendants' First Common Set of Interrogatories Relating to the '970 Track; and 2) CallWave Communications, LLC's Responses to Defendants' First Set of Common Interrogatories Relating to the '933 Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
April 4, 2014 Filing 82 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) CallWave Communications, LLC's Responses to Defendants' First Common Set of Interrogatories Relating to the '970 Track; and 2) CallWave Communications, LLC's Responses to Defendants' First Set of Common Interrogatories Relating to the '933 Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
April 4, 2014 Filing 81 NOTICE OF SERVICE of CallWave Communications, LLC's Responses to Defendants' First Common Interrogatories Relating to the Call Processing Track (Nos. 1-6) filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
April 4, 2014 Filing 81 NOTICE OF SERVICE of CallWave Communications, LLC's Responses to Defendants' First Common Interrogatories Relating to the Call Processing Track (Nos. 1-6) filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
April 3, 2014 Filing 80 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Google's First Set of Requests for Production to Plaintiff Relating to the '933 Track filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
April 3, 2014 Filing 80 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Google's First Set of Requests for Production to Plaintiff Relating to the '933 Track filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
April 3, 2014 Filing 79 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Google's First Set of Requests for Production to Plaintiff Relating to the '970 Track filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
April 3, 2014 Filing 79 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Google's First Set of Requests for Production to Plaintiff Relating to the '970 Track filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
April 1, 2014 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Leah R. McCoy,Suparna Datta for CallWave Communications LLC added for electronic noticing. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA et al.(dmp, )
April 1, 2014 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Leah R. McCoy,Suparna Datta for CallWave Communications LLC added for electronic noticing. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA et al.(dmp, )
March 28, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 78 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Suparna Datta filed by CallWave Communications LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/28/2014. (nms)
March 28, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #78 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Suparna Datta filed by CallWave Communications LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/28/2014. (nms)
March 27, 2014 Filing 78 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Suparna Datta - filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McMillan, James)
March 27, 2014 Filing 78 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Suparna Datta - filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McMillan, James)
March 26, 2014 Filing 77 NOTICE OF SERVICE of T-Mobile's Paragraph 3 Disclosures Regarding the '970 Track filed by T-Moblie USA Inc..(Connolly, Arthur)
March 26, 2014 Filing 77 NOTICE OF SERVICE of T-Mobile's Paragraph 3 Disclosures Regarding the '970 Track filed by T-Moblie USA Inc..(Connolly, Arthur)
March 25, 2014 Filing 76 NOTICE OF SERVICE of CallWave Communications, LLC's Disclosure Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Default Discovery Standard filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
March 25, 2014 Filing 76 NOTICE OF SERVICE of CallWave Communications, LLC's Disclosure Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Default Discovery Standard filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
March 24, 2014 Filing 75 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Disclosure of Defendant Google Inc. Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Delaware Default Standard for Discovery and Paragraph 3 of the Proposed Order Regarding Discovery, Including Discovery of Electronically Stored Information filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
March 24, 2014 Filing 75 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Disclosure of Defendant Google Inc. Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Delaware Default Standard for Discovery and Paragraph 3 of the Proposed Order Regarding Discovery, Including Discovery of Electronically Stored Information filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
March 21, 2014 Filing 74 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Leah R. McCoy - filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McMillan, James)
March 21, 2014 Filing 74 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Leah R. McCoy - filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McMillan, James)
March 21, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 74 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Leah R. McCoy filed by CallWave Communications LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/21/2014. (nms)
March 21, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #74 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Leah R. McCoy filed by CallWave Communications LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/21/2014. (nms)
March 20, 2014 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Christopher Boundy for CallWave Communications LLC added for electronic noticing. (dmp, )
March 20, 2014 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Christopher Boundy for CallWave Communications LLC added for electronic noticing. (dmp, )
March 13, 2014 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER: The parties have advised that a discovery dispute has arisen requiring judicial attention. The Court will hold a Discovery conference on 4/9/2014, at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews, to take up this issue. In preparation for this conference the parties shall follow the Discovery Matters and Disputes procedure as set forth in the Scheduling Order.. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/13/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA et al.(ksr, )
March 13, 2014 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER: The parties have advised that a discovery dispute has arisen requiring judicial attention. The Court will hold a Discovery conference on 4/9/2014, at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews, to take up this issue. In preparation for this conference the parties shall follow the Discovery Matters and Disputes procedure as set forth in the Scheduling Order.. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/13/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA et al.(ksr, )
March 10, 2014 Filing 73 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christopher Boundy - filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certification by Christopher Boundy, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(McMillan, James)
March 10, 2014 Filing 73 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christopher Boundy - filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certification by Christopher Boundy, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(McMillan, James)
March 10, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 73 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christopher Boundy filed by CallWave Communications LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/10/2014. (nms)
March 10, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #73 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christopher Boundy filed by CallWave Communications LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/10/2014. (nms)
February 28, 2014 Filing 72 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' First Set of Common Interrogatories to Plaintiff Relating to the '970 Track filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
February 28, 2014 Filing 72 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' First Set of Common Interrogatories to Plaintiff Relating to the '970 Track filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
February 28, 2014 Filing 71 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' First Set of Common Interrogatories to Plaintiff Relating to the '933 Track filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
February 28, 2014 Filing 71 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' First Set of Common Interrogatories to Plaintiff Relating to the '933 Track filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
February 28, 2014 Filing 70 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Google's Responses to Plaintiff's First Requests for Production to Google Related to the Call Processing Track (1-11); (2) Google Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Callwave Communications, LLC's First Collective Requests for Production to all Defendants Related to the '933 Track (1-26); (3) Google Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Callwave Communications, LLC's First Collective Requests for Production to All Defendants Related to the '970 Track (1-26); (4) Google Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Callwave Communications, LLC's First Collective Requests for Production to all Defendants Related to the Call processing Track (1-26); (5) Google's Response to Plaintiff's First Interrogatories to Google Regarding the '933 Track (1); (6) Google Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Callwave Communications, LLC's First Interrogatories to Google Regarding the '970 Track (1); (7) Google Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Callwave Communications, LLC's First Interrogatories to Google Regarding the Call Processing Track (1); (8) Google's Response to Plaintiff's First Collective Interrogatories to the '933 Track Defendants (1-7); (9) Google's Responses to Plaintiff's First Collective Interrogatories to the '970 Track Defendants (1-7); and (10) Google's Responses to Plaintiff's First Collective Interrogatories to the Call Processing Track Defendants (1-7) filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
February 28, 2014 Filing 70 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Google's Responses to Plaintiff's First Requests for Production to Google Related to the Call Processing Track (1-11); (2) Google Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Callwave Communications, LLC's First Collective Requests for Production to all Defendants Related to the '933 Track (1-26); (3) Google Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Callwave Communications, LLC's First Collective Requests for Production to All Defendants Related to the '970 Track (1-26); (4) Google Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Callwave Communications, LLC's First Collective Requests for Production to all Defendants Related to the Call processing Track (1-26); (5) Google's Response to Plaintiff's First Interrogatories to Google Regarding the '933 Track (1); (6) Google Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Callwave Communications, LLC's First Interrogatories to Google Regarding the '970 Track (1); (7) Google Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Callwave Communications, LLC's First Interrogatories to Google Regarding the Call Processing Track (1); (8) Google's Response to Plaintiff's First Collective Interrogatories to the '933 Track Defendants (1-7); (9) Google's Responses to Plaintiff's First Collective Interrogatories to the '970 Track Defendants (1-7); and (10) Google's Responses to Plaintiff's First Collective Interrogatories to the Call Processing Track Defendants (1-7) filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
February 28, 2014 Filing 69 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) T-Mobile USA, Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Collective Interrogatories to 933 Track Defendants (1-7); (2) T-Mobile USA, Inc.'s Objections and Response to Plaintiff's First Collective Requests for Production to All Defendants Related to the 933 Track (1-26); (3) T-Mobile USA, Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Interrogatories to T-Mobile USA, Inc. Regarding the 933 Track (1); (4) T-Mobile's Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Collective Interrogatories to '970 Track Defendants (1-7); (5) T-Mobile's Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Interrogatories to T-Mobile USA, Inc. Relating to the '970 track Defendants (1); and (6) T-Mobile's Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Collective Requests for Production To All '970 Track Defendants (1-26). filed by T-Moblie USA Inc..(Connolly, Arthur)
February 28, 2014 Filing 69 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) T-Mobile USA, Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Collective Interrogatories to 933 Track Defendants (1-7); (2) T-Mobile USA, Inc.'s Objections and Response to Plaintiff's First Collective Requests for Production to All Defendants Related to the 933 Track (1-26); (3) T-Mobile USA, Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Interrogatories to T-Mobile USA, Inc. Regarding the 933 Track (1); (4) T-Mobile's Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Collective Interrogatories to '970 Track Defendants (1-7); (5) T-Mobile's Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Interrogatories to T-Mobile USA, Inc. Relating to the '970 track Defendants (1); and (6) T-Mobile's Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Collective Requests for Production To All '970 Track Defendants (1-26). filed by T-Moblie USA Inc..(Connolly, Arthur)
February 25, 2014 Filing 68 ANSWER to #18 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand, by T-Moblie USA Inc..(Connolly, Arthur) Modified on 2/26/2014 (nms).
February 25, 2014 Filing 68 ANSWER to 18 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand, by T-Moblie USA Inc..(Connolly, Arthur) Modified on 2/26/2014 (nms).
February 25, 2014 Filing 67 ANSWER to 18 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand, by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul) Modified on 2/25/2014 (nms).
February 25, 2014 Filing 67 ANSWER to #18 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand, by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul) Modified on 2/25/2014 (nms).
February 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 66 SO ORDERED, re (60 in 1:12-cv-01788-RGA, 60 in 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 68 in 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 72 in 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 65 in 1:12-cv-01703-RGA) MOTION to Set the Time to Answer the Complaints, filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, Google Inc., AT & T Mobility LLC, T-Moblie USA Inc., Cellco Partnership, Sprint Nextel Corp., Verizon Communications Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/4/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
February 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 66 SO ORDERED, re (60 in 1:12-cv-01788-RGA, 60 in 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 68 in 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 72 in 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 65 in 1:12-cv-01703-RGA) MOTION to Set the Time to Answer the Complaints, filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, Google Inc., AT & T Mobility LLC, T-Moblie USA Inc., Cellco Partnership, Sprint Nextel Corp., Verizon Communications Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/4/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
February 3, 2014 Filing 65 MOTION to Set the Time to Answer the Complaints - filed by AT & T Mobility LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, Google Inc., T-Moblie USA Inc., Cellco Partnership, Verizon Communications Inc., Sprint Nextel Corp.. (Saindon, Paul)
February 3, 2014 Filing 65 MOTION to Set the Time to Answer the Complaints - filed by AT & T Mobility LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, Google Inc., T-Moblie USA Inc., Cellco Partnership, Verizon Communications Inc., Sprint Nextel Corp.. (Saindon, Paul)
January 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER: On or before February 13, 2014, each party or each party group shall email to Magistrate Judge Thynge, with a copy to her Judicial Administrator, Cathleen Kennedy, the information required in the Order. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 1/30/14. (cak)
January 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER: On or before February 13, 2014, each party or each party group shall email to Magistrate Judge Thynge, with a copy to her Judicial Administrator, Cathleen Kennedy, the information required in the Order. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 1/30/14. (cak)
January 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER Granting (D.I. 30 in 12-cv-01701-RGA) MOTION to Dismiss, and Granting in part and Denying in part (D.I. 32 in 12-cv-01701-RGA); Granting (D.I. 26 in 12-cv-01702-RGA) MOTION to Dismiss, and Granting in part and Denying in part (D.I. 28 in 12-cv-01702-RGA) MOTION to Dismiss; Granting (D.I. 27 in 12-cv-01703-RGA) MOTION to Dismiss, and Granting in part and Denying in part (D.I. 24 in 12-cv-01703-RGA) MOTION to Dismiss; Granting (D.I. 23 in 12-cv-01704-RGA) MOTION to Dismiss, and Granting in part and Denying in part (D.I. 25 in 12-cv-01704-RGA) MOTION to Dismiss; and Granting in part and Denying in part (D.I. 27 in 12-cv-01788-RGA) MOTION to Dismiss. Plaintiff is given leave to file a second amended complaint including indirect infringement claims within two weeks. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/28/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
January 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER Granting (D.I. 30 in 12-cv-01701-RGA) MOTION to Dismiss, and Granting in part and Denying in part (D.I. 32 in 12-cv-01701-RGA); Granting (D.I. 26 in 12-cv-01702-RGA) MOTION to Dismiss, and Granting in part and Denying in part (D.I. 28 in 12-cv-01702-RGA) MOTION to Dismiss; Granting (D.I. 27 in 12-cv-01703-RGA) MOTION to Dismiss, and Granting in part and Denying in part (D.I. 24 in 12-cv-01703-RGA) MOTION to Dismiss; Granting (D.I. 23 in 12-cv-01704-RGA) MOTION to Dismiss, and Granting in part and Denying in part (D.I. 25 in 12-cv-01704-RGA) MOTION to Dismiss; and Granting in part and Denying in part (D.I. 27 in 12-cv-01788-RGA) MOTION to Dismiss. Plaintiff is given leave to file a second amended complaint including indirect infringement claims within two weeks. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/28/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
January 27, 2014 Filing 62 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) Plaintiff's First Collective Interrogatories (1-7) to '933 Track Defendants, 2) Plaintiff's First Collective Interrogatories (1-7) to '970 Track Defendants; 3) Plaintiff's First Collective Requests for Production (1-26) to All '933 Track Defendants; and 4) Plaintiff's First Collective Requests for Production (1-26) to All '970 Track Defendants filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(Johnson, Edmond)
January 27, 2014 Filing 62 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) Plaintiff's First Collective Interrogatories (1-7) to '933 Track Defendants, 2) Plaintiff's First Collective Interrogatories (1-7) to '970 Track Defendants; 3) Plaintiff's First Collective Requests for Production (1-26) to All '933 Track Defendants; and 4) Plaintiff's First Collective Requests for Production (1-26) to All '970 Track Defendants filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(Johnson, Edmond)
January 27, 2014 Filing 61 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff CallWave Communications, LLC's Identification of Accused Products, Asserted Patents, and Asserted Claims to All Defendants filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(Johnson, Edmond)
January 27, 2014 Filing 61 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff CallWave Communications, LLC's Identification of Accused Products, Asserted Patents, and Asserted Claims to All Defendants filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(Johnson, Edmond)
January 27, 2014 Filing 60 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's First Interrogatories to T-Mobile USA Inc. Regarding the '933 Track (1) and Plaintiff's First Interrogatories to T-Mobile USA Inc. Relating to the '970 Track (1) filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(Johnson, Edmond)
January 27, 2014 Filing 60 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's First Interrogatories to T-Mobile USA Inc. Regarding the '933 Track (1) and Plaintiff's First Interrogatories to T-Mobile USA Inc. Relating to the '970 Track (1) filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(Johnson, Edmond)
January 27, 2014 Filing 59 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) Plaintiff's First Interrogatories to Google, Inc. Relating to the '970 Track (1); 2) Plaintiff's First Interrogatories to Google, Inc. Regarding the Call Processing Track (1); and 3) Plaintiff's First Interrogatories to Google, Inc. Regarding the '933 Track (1) filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(Johnson, Edmond)
January 27, 2014 Filing 59 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) Plaintiff's First Interrogatories to Google, Inc. Relating to the '970 Track (1); 2) Plaintiff's First Interrogatories to Google, Inc. Regarding the Call Processing Track (1); and 3) Plaintiff's First Interrogatories to Google, Inc. Regarding the '933 Track (1) filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(Johnson, Edmond)
January 21, 2014 Filing 58 Amended Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Deutsche Telekom AG, Corporate Parent T-Mobile Global Holding GmbH, Corporate Parent T-Mobile Global Zwischenholding GmbH, Corporate Parent T-Mobile US, Inc., Corporate Parent Deutsche Telekom Holding B.V. for T-Moblie USA Inc. filed by T-Moblie USA Inc.. (Connolly, Arthur)
January 21, 2014 Filing 58 Amended Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Deutsche Telekom AG, Corporate Parent T-Mobile Global Holding GmbH, Corporate Parent T-Mobile Global Zwischenholding GmbH, Corporate Parent T-Mobile US, Inc., Corporate Parent Deutsche Telekom Holding B.V. for T-Moblie USA Inc. filed by T-Moblie USA Inc.. (Connolly, Arthur)
January 14, 2014 Filing 57 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant T-Mobile USA, Inc.'s Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by T-Moblie USA Inc..(Connolly, Arthur)
January 14, 2014 Filing 57 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant T-Mobile USA, Inc.'s Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by T-Moblie USA Inc..(Connolly, Arthur)
January 13, 2014 Filing 56 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures of Google Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) filed by Google Inc..(Blumenfeld, Jack)
January 13, 2014 Filing 56 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures of Google Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) filed by Google Inc..(Blumenfeld, Jack)
January 13, 2014 Filing 55 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff CallWave Communications, LLC's Rule 26(A) Initial Disclosures filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
January 13, 2014 Filing 55 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff CallWave Communications, LLC's Rule 26(A) Initial Disclosures filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
January 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER Setting Teleconference: Counsel for Callwave to initiate the call. A Telephone Conference is set for 1/27/2014 at 2:30 PM EASTERN TIMNE before Judge Mary Pat Thynge to discuss ADR. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 1/7/14. (cak)
January 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER Setting Teleconference: Counsel for Callwave to initiate the call. A Telephone Conference is set for 1/27/2014 at 2:30 PM EASTERN TIMNE before Judge Mary Pat Thynge to discuss ADR. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 1/7/14. (cak)
January 7, 2014 CASE REFERRED to Mediation. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(cak)
January 7, 2014 CASE REFERRED to Mediation. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(cak)
January 6, 2014 Filing 53 NOTICE of Withdrawal of 24 Motion to Dismiss by T-Moblie USA Inc.. (Connolly, Arthur) Modified on 1/6/2014 (nms).
January 6, 2014 Filing 53 NOTICE of Withdrawal of #24 Motion to Dismiss by T-Moblie USA Inc.. (Connolly, Arthur) Modified on 1/6/2014 (nms).
January 6, 2014 CASE REFERRED to Judge Thynge for Mediation. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA, 1:13-cv-00711-RGA(cak)
January 6, 2014 CASE REFERRED to Judge Thynge for Mediation. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA, 1:13-cv-00711-RGA(cak)
December 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 52 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case referred to the Magistrate Judge for the purpose of exploring ADR. Joinder of Parties due by 6/17/2014. Amended Pleadings due by 6/17/2014. Fact Discovery due by 2/25/2015. A Trial Scheduling Conference is set for 8/28/2015, at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews Dispositive Motions due by 5/28/2015, and 8/7/2015. Joint Claim Construction Briefs due by 10/9/2014, and 12/10/2014. A Markman Hearings are set for 10/29/2014, and 1/7/2015, at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/20/2013. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA et al.(nms)
December 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 52 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case referred to the Magistrate Judge for the purpose of exploring ADR. Joinder of Parties due by 6/17/2014. Amended Pleadings due by 6/17/2014. Fact Discovery due by 2/25/2015. A Trial Scheduling Conference is set for 8/28/2015, at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews Dispositive Motions due by 5/28/2015, and 8/7/2015. Joint Claim Construction Briefs due by 10/9/2014, and 12/10/2014. A Markman Hearings are set for 10/29/2014, and 1/7/2015, at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/20/2013. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA et al.(nms)
December 20, 2013 Filing 51 Proposed Scheduling Order, by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James) Modified on 12/20/2013 (nms).
December 20, 2013 Filing 51 Proposed Scheduling Order, by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James) Modified on 12/20/2013 (nms).
December 20, 2013 CORRECTING ENTRY: DI 51 has been removed per request of the filer. (cla, )
December 20, 2013 CORRECTING ENTRY: DI 51 has been removed per request of the filer. (cla, )
December 17, 2013 Filing 50 Official Transcript of Scheduling Conference held on 12-12-13 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leonard A. DIbbs. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/7/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/17/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/17/2014. (lad)
December 17, 2013 Filing 50 Official Transcript of Scheduling Conference held on 12-12-13 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leonard A. DIbbs. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/7/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/17/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/17/2014. (lad)
December 12, 2013 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER: The Motion to Sever (D.I. 42 ) is DISMISSED AS PREMATURE, as discussed at the Rule 16 hearing on December 12, 2013. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/12/2013. (nms)
December 12, 2013 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Andrews - Scheduling Conference held on 12/12/2013. (Court Reporter Leonard Dibbs.) Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA et al.(ksr, )
December 12, 2013 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER: The Motion to Sever (D.I. #42 ) is DISMISSED AS PREMATURE, as discussed at the Rule 16 hearing on December 12, 2013. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/12/2013. (nms)
December 12, 2013 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Andrews - Scheduling Conference held on 12/12/2013. (Court Reporter Leonard Dibbs.) Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA et al.(ksr, )
December 10, 2013 Filing 49 PROPOSED Scheduling Order, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Johnson, Edmond) Modified on 12/11/2013 (nms).
December 10, 2013 Filing 49 PROPOSED Scheduling Order, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Johnson, Edmond) Modified on 12/11/2013 (nms).
December 6, 2013 Filing 48 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding consideration of Defendants' motion to sever in connection with upcoming scheduling conference. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
December 6, 2013 Filing 48 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding consideration of Defendants' motion to sever in connection with upcoming scheduling conference. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
December 5, 2013 Filing 47 REPLY BRIEF re 42 MOTION to Sever filed by Google Inc., T-Moblie USA Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
December 5, 2013 Filing 47 REPLY BRIEF re #42 MOTION to Sever filed by Google Inc., T-Moblie USA Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
November 25, 2013 Filing 46 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 42 MOTION to Sever filed by CallWave Communications LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 12/5/2013. (McMillan, James)
November 25, 2013 Filing 46 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #42 MOTION to Sever filed by CallWave Communications LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 12/5/2013. (McMillan, James)
November 18, 2013 Filing 45 Order Setting Rule 16(b) Conference: A Scheduling Conference is set for 12/12/2013, at 1:00 PM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/18/2013. (nms)
November 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Order Setting Rule 16(b) Conference: A Scheduling Conference is set for 12/12/2013, at 1:00 PM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/18/2013. (nms)
November 15, 2013 Filing 44 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding pending motions to sever and scheduling conference. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
November 15, 2013 Filing 44 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding pending motions to sever and scheduling conference. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
November 12, 2013 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Kirk R. Ruthenberg for T-Moblie USA Inc. added for electronic noticing. (dmp, )
November 12, 2013 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Kirk R. Ruthenberg for T-Moblie USA Inc. added for electronic noticing. (dmp, )
November 11, 2013 Filing 43 OPENING BRIEF in Support re 42 MOTION to Sever filed by Google Inc., T-Moblie USA Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 11/29/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A-B, # 2 Exhibit A)(Saindon, Paul)
November 11, 2013 Filing 43 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #42 MOTION to Sever filed by Google Inc., T-Moblie USA Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 11/29/2013. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A-B, #2 Exhibit A)(Saindon, Paul)
November 8, 2013 Filing 42 MOTION to Sever - filed by AT & T Mobility LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, Google Inc., T-Moblie USA Inc., Cellco Partnership, Verizon Communications Inc., Sprint Nextel Corp.. (Saindon, Paul)
November 8, 2013 Filing 42 MOTION to Sever - filed by AT & T Mobility LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, Google Inc., T-Moblie USA Inc., Cellco Partnership, Verizon Communications Inc., Sprint Nextel Corp.. (Saindon, Paul)
November 7, 2013 Filing 41 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Edmond D. Johnson, Esq. regarding Request for a Scheduling Conference. (Johnson, Edmond)
November 7, 2013 Filing 41 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Edmond D. Johnson, Esq. regarding Request for a Scheduling Conference. (Johnson, Edmond)
November 6, 2013 Filing 40 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Imran A. Khaliq as co-counsel. Reason for request: no longer affiliated with Dentons US LLP. (Connolly, Arthur)
November 6, 2013 Filing 40 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Imran A. Khaliq as co-counsel. Reason for request: no longer affiliated with Dentons US LLP. (Connolly, Arthur)
October 21, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 39 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kirk R. Ruthenberg filed by T-Moblie USA Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/21/2013. (nms)
October 21, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #39 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kirk R. Ruthenberg filed by T-Moblie USA Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/21/2013. (nms)
October 18, 2013 Filing 39 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kirk R. Ruthenberg - filed by T-Moblie USA Inc.. (Connolly, Arthur)
October 18, 2013 Filing 39 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kirk R. Ruthenberg - filed by T-Moblie USA Inc.. (Connolly, Arthur)
September 16, 2013 Filing 38 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by CallWave Communications LLC identifying Corporate Parent no corporate parent or other affiliate for CallWave Communications LLC.. (McMillan, James)
September 16, 2013 Filing 38 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by CallWave Communications LLC identifying Corporate Parent no corporate parent or other affiliate for CallWave Communications LLC.. (McMillan, James)
September 4, 2013 Filing 37 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding response to Plaintiff's September 3, 2013 letter - re (18 in 1:13-cv-00711-RGA, 38 in 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 44 in 1:12-cv-01748-RGA, 36 in 1:12-cv-01788-RGA, 36 in 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 38 in 1:13-cv-00074-RGA, 33 in 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 43 in 1:12-cv-01701-RGA) Letter. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
September 4, 2013 Filing 37 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding response to Plaintiff's September 3, 2013 letter - re (18 in 1:13-cv-00711-RGA, 38 in 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 44 in 1:12-cv-01748-RGA, 36 in 1:12-cv-01788-RGA, 36 in 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 38 in 1:13-cv-00074-RGA, 33 in 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 43 in 1:12-cv-01701-RGA) Letter. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
September 3, 2013 Filing 36 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Edmond D. Johnson, Esq. regarding request for scheduling conference. (Johnson, Edmond)
September 3, 2013 Filing 36 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Edmond D. Johnson, Esq. regarding request for scheduling conference. (Johnson, Edmond)
July 29, 2013 Filing 35 NOTICE of Subsequent Authority by CallWave Communications LLC re Motions to Dismiss. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(McMillan, James) Modified on 7/29/2013 (nms).
July 29, 2013 Filing 35 NOTICE of Subsequent Authority by CallWave Communications LLC re Motions to Dismiss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(McMillan, James) Modified on 7/29/2013 (nms).
July 25, 2013 Filing 34 NOTICE of Subsequent Authority by AT&T Mobility LLC, T-Moblie USA Inc., Cellco Partnership, Google Inc., Verizon Communications Inc., Sprint Nextel Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Blumenfeld, Jack)
July 25, 2013 Filing 34 NOTICE of Subsequent Authority by AT&T Mobility LLC, T-Moblie USA Inc., Cellco Partnership, Google Inc., Verizon Communications Inc., Sprint Nextel Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Blumenfeld, Jack)
July 8, 2013 Filing 33 REPLY BRIEF re 27 MOTION to Dismiss, filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-D)(Saindon, Paul) Modified on 7/9/2013 (nms).
July 8, 2013 Filing 33 REPLY BRIEF re #27 MOTION to Dismiss, filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-D)(Saindon, Paul) Modified on 7/9/2013 (nms).
July 8, 2013 Filing 32 REPLY BRIEF re #24 MOTION to Dismiss, filed by T-Moblie USA Inc.. (Connolly, Arthur) Modified on 7/9/2013 (nms).
July 8, 2013 Filing 32 REPLY BRIEF re 24 MOTION to Dismiss, filed by T-Moblie USA Inc.. (Connolly, Arthur) Modified on 7/9/2013 (nms).
July 1, 2013 Filing 31 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant T-Mobile USA Inc. to file its reply brief in support of its motion to dismiss to July 8, 2013 - filed by CallWave Communications LLC, T-Moblie USA Inc.. (Connolly, Arthur)
July 1, 2013 Filing 31 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant T-Mobile USA Inc. to file its reply brief in support of its motion to dismiss to July 8, 2013 - filed by CallWave Communications LLC, T-Moblie USA Inc.. (Connolly, Arthur)
July 1, 2013 Filing 30 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant Google Inc. to file its reply brief in support of its motion to dismiss to July 8, 2013 - filed by Google Inc., CallWave Communications LLC. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
July 1, 2013 Filing 30 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant Google Inc. to file its reply brief in support of its motion to dismiss to July 8, 2013 - filed by Google Inc., CallWave Communications LLC. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
July 1, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 31 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant T-Mobile USA Inc. to file its reply brief in support of 24 motion to dismiss to July 8, 2013, filed by CallWave Communications LLC, T-Moblie USA Inc. (Reset Briefing Schedule: re 24 MOTION to Dismiss; Reply Brief due 7/8/2013). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/1/2013. (nms)
July 1, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #31 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant T-Mobile USA Inc. to file its reply brief in support of #24 motion to dismiss to July 8, 2013, filed by CallWave Communications LLC, T-Moblie USA Inc. (Reset Briefing Schedule: re #24 MOTION to Dismiss; Reply Brief due 7/8/2013). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/1/2013. (nms)
July 1, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (30 in 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 37 in 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 27 in 1:12-cv-01704-RGA) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant Google Inc. to file its reply brief in support of its Motion to dismiss to July 8, 2013, filed by Google Inc., CallWave Communications LLC (Reset Briefing Schedule: re 27 in 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 23 in 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 26 in 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 30 in 1:12-cv-01701-RGA; MOTIONS to Dismiss. Reply Briefs due 7/8/2013)s. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/1/2013. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(nms)
July 1, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (30 in 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 37 in 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 27 in 1:12-cv-01704-RGA) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant Google Inc. to file its reply brief in support of its Motion to dismiss to July 8, 2013, filed by Google Inc., CallWave Communications LLC (Reset Briefing Schedule: re 27 in 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 23 in 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 26 in 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 30 in 1:12-cv-01701-RGA; MOTIONS to Dismiss. Reply Briefs due 7/8/2013)s. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/1/2013. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(nms)
June 20, 2013 Filing 29 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 27 MOTION to Dismiss, and 24 MOTION to Dismiss, filed by CallWave Communications LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 7/1/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(McMillan, James) Modified on 6/25/2013 (nms).
June 20, 2013 Filing 29 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #27 MOTION to Dismiss, and #24 MOTION to Dismiss, filed by CallWave Communications LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 7/1/2013. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(McMillan, James) Modified on 6/25/2013 (nms).
June 3, 2013 Filing 28 OPENING BRIEF in Support re 27 MOTION to Dismiss the Willful Infringement Claims in Callwave's Amended Complaints Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, filed by Google Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 6/20/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 6/4/2013 (nms).
June 3, 2013 Filing 28 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #27 MOTION to Dismiss the Willful Infringement Claims in Callwave's Amended Complaints Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, filed by Google Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 6/20/2013. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 6/4/2013 (nms).
June 3, 2013 Filing 27 MOTION to Dismiss the Willful Infringement Claims in Callwave's Amended Complaints Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure - filed by Google Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 6/4/2013 (nms).
June 3, 2013 Filing 27 MOTION to Dismiss the Willful Infringement Claims in Callwave's Amended Complaints Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure - filed by Google Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 6/4/2013 (nms).
June 3, 2013 Filing 26 DECLARATION of Imran A. Khaliq re 24 MOTION to Dismiss, by T-Moblie USA Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Connolly, Arthur) Modified on 6/4/2013 (nms).
June 3, 2013 Filing 26 DECLARATION of Imran A. Khaliq re #24 MOTION to Dismiss, by T-Moblie USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Connolly, Arthur) Modified on 6/4/2013 (nms).
June 3, 2013 Filing 25 OPENING BRIEF in Support re 24 MOTION to Dismiss, filed by T-Moblie USA Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 6/20/2013. (Connolly, Arthur) Modified on 6/4/2013 (nms).
June 3, 2013 Filing 25 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #24 MOTION to Dismiss, filed by T-Moblie USA Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 6/20/2013. (Connolly, Arthur) Modified on 6/4/2013 (nms).
June 3, 2013 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss - filed by T-Moblie USA Inc.. (Connolly, Arthur) Modified on 6/4/2013 (nms).
June 3, 2013 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss - filed by T-Moblie USA Inc.. (Connolly, Arthur) Modified on 6/4/2013 (nms).
May 16, 2013 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Mark L. Hogge for T-Moblie USA Inc. added for electronic noticing. (dmp, )
May 16, 2013 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Mark L. Hogge for T-Moblie USA Inc. added for electronic noticing. (dmp, )
May 15, 2013 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Shailendra K. Maheshwari for T-Moblie USA Inc. added for electronic noticing. (dmp, )
May 15, 2013 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Shailendra K. Maheshwari for T-Moblie USA Inc. added for electronic noticing. (dmp, )
May 14, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 23 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Mark L. Hogge, Shailendra K. Maheshwari, and Imran A. Khaliq filed by T-Moblie USA Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/14/2013. (nms)
May 14, 2013 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Imran A. Khaliq for T-Moblie USA Inc. added for electronic noticing. (dmp, )
May 14, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #23 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Mark L. Hogge, Shailendra K. Maheshwari, and Imran A. Khaliq filed by T-Moblie USA Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/14/2013. (nms)
May 14, 2013 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Imran A. Khaliq for T-Moblie USA Inc. added for electronic noticing. (dmp, )
May 13, 2013 Filing 23 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Mark L. Hogge, Shailendra K. Maheshwari, and Imran A. Khaliq - filed by T-Moblie USA Inc.. (Connolly, Arthur)
May 13, 2013 Filing 23 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Mark L. Hogge, Shailendra K. Maheshwari, and Imran A. Khaliq - filed by T-Moblie USA Inc.. (Connolly, Arthur)
May 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SO ORDERED, re 21 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer First Amended Complaint to June 3, 2013, filed by Google Inc., CallWave Communications LLC, T-Moblie USA Inc. (Reset Answer Deadlines: Google Inc. answer due 6/3/2013; T-Moblie USA Inc. answer due 6/3/2013). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/3/2013. (nms)
May 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SO ORDERED, re #21 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer First Amended Complaint to June 3, 2013, filed by Google Inc., CallWave Communications LLC, T-Moblie USA Inc. (Reset Answer Deadlines: Google Inc. answer due 6/3/2013; T-Moblie USA Inc. answer due 6/3/2013). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/3/2013. (nms)
May 3, 2013 Filing 21 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer First Amended Complaint to June 3, 2013 - filed by CallWave Communications LLC, Google Inc., T-Moblie USA Inc.. (Saindon, Paul)
May 3, 2013 Filing 21 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer First Amended Complaint to June 3, 2013 - filed by CallWave Communications LLC, Google Inc., T-Moblie USA Inc.. (Saindon, Paul)
April 29, 2013 Filing 20 NOTICE of Withdraw 16 MOTION to Dismiss - filed by T-Moblie USA Inc.. (Connolly, Arthur) Modified on 4/29/2013 (nms).
April 29, 2013 Filing 20 NOTICE of Withdraw #16 MOTION to Dismiss - filed by T-Moblie USA Inc.. (Connolly, Arthur) Modified on 4/29/2013 (nms).
April 26, 2013 Filing 19 NOTICE to Withdraw 13 MOTION to Dismiss - filed by Google Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 4/29/2013 (nms).
April 26, 2013 Filing 19 NOTICE to Withdraw #13 MOTION to Dismiss - filed by Google Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 4/29/2013 (nms).
April 19, 2013 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER: The parties shall advise as to whether the Motions to Dismiss (D.I. 13 and 16 ) are now viewed as moot per the filing of 18 Amended Complaint. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/19/2013. (nms)
April 19, 2013 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER: The parties shall advise as to whether the Motions to Dismiss (D.I. #13 and #16 ) are now viewed as moot per the filing of #18 Amended Complaint. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/19/2013. (nms)
April 18, 2013 Filing 18 First Amended COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement, against Google Inc., T-Moblie USA Inc.- filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(McMillan, James) Modified on 4/19/2013 (nms).
April 18, 2013 Filing 18 First Amended COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement, against Google Inc., T-Moblie USA Inc.- filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(McMillan, James) Modified on 4/19/2013 (nms).
April 18, 2013 Filing 17 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 13 MOTION to Dismiss, 16 MOTION to Dismiss filed by CallWave Communications LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 4/29/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(McMillan, James)
April 18, 2013 Filing 17 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Dismiss, #16 MOTION to Dismiss filed by CallWave Communications LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 4/29/2013. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(McMillan, James)
April 3, 2013 Remark: Set Answering Brief Deadline re #16 MOTION to Dismiss. Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 4/19/2013. (nms)
April 3, 2013 Remark: Set Answering Brief Deadline re 16 MOTION to Dismiss. Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 4/19/2013. (nms)
April 2, 2013 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss - filed by T-Moblie USA Inc.. (Connolly, Arthur) Modified on 4/2/2013 (nms).
April 2, 2013 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss - filed by T-Moblie USA Inc.. (Connolly, Arthur) Modified on 4/2/2013 (nms).
April 1, 2013 Filing 15 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Google Inc. identifying Corporate Parent None for corporate parent or other public affiliates for Google Inc... (Blumenfeld, Jack)
April 1, 2013 Filing 15 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Google Inc. identifying Corporate Parent None for corporate parent or other public affiliates for Google Inc... (Blumenfeld, Jack)
April 1, 2013 Filing 14 OPENING BRIEF in Support re 13 MOTION to Dismiss, filed by Google Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 4/18/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 4/1/2013 (nms).
April 1, 2013 Filing 14 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #13 MOTION to Dismiss, filed by Google Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 4/18/2013. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 4/1/2013 (nms).
April 1, 2013 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss - filed by Google Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 4/1/2013 (nms).
April 1, 2013 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss - filed by Google Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 4/1/2013 (nms).
March 25, 2013 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Kaustuv M. Das,Ramsey M. Al-Salam for T-Moblie USA Inc. added for electronic noticing. (els)
March 25, 2013 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Kaustuv M. Das,Ramsey M. Al-Salam for T-Moblie USA Inc. added for electronic noticing. (els)
March 22, 2013 Pro Hac Vice Attorney James F. Hurst,Scott R. Samay,Peter Lambrianakos,Krishnan Padmanabhan,Xi Chen for Google Inc. added for electronic noticing. (dmp, )
March 22, 2013 Pro Hac Vice Attorney James F. Hurst,Scott R. Samay,Peter Lambrianakos,Krishnan Padmanabhan,Xi Chen for Google Inc. added for electronic noticing. (dmp, )
March 21, 2013 Filing 12 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by T-Moblie USA Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Deutsche Telekom AG, Corporate Parent T-Mobile Global Holding GmbH, Corporate Parent T-Mobile Global Zwischenholding GmbH for T-Moblie USA Inc... (Connolly, Arthur)
March 21, 2013 Filing 12 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by T-Moblie USA Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Deutsche Telekom AG, Corporate Parent T-Mobile Global Holding GmbH, Corporate Parent T-Mobile Global Zwischenholding GmbH for T-Moblie USA Inc... (Connolly, Arthur)
March 21, 2013 Filing 11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Ramsey M. Al-Salam and Kaustuv M. Das - filed by T-Moblie USA Inc.. (Connolly, Arthur)
March 21, 2013 Filing 11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Ramsey M. Al-Salam and Kaustuv M. Das - filed by T-Moblie USA Inc.. (Connolly, Arthur)
March 21, 2013 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Arthur G. Connolly, III on behalf of T-Moblie USA Inc. (Connolly, Arthur)
March 21, 2013 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Arthur G. Connolly, III on behalf of T-Moblie USA Inc. (Connolly, Arthur)
March 21, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Ramsey M. Al-Salam and Kaustuv M. Das filed by T-Moblie USA Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/21/2013. (nms)
March 21, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Ramsey M. Al-Salam and Kaustuv M. Das filed by T-Moblie USA Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/21/2013. (nms)
March 21, 2013 CORRECTING ENTRY: The pro hac motion filed at D.I. 11 has been removed as the pdf did not match the filing. Counsel shall re-file the motion with the appropriate pdf. (nms)
March 21, 2013 CORRECTING ENTRY: The pro hac motion filed at D.I. 11 has been removed as the pdf did not match the filing. Counsel shall re-file the motion with the appropriate pdf. (nms)
March 13, 2013 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CallWave Communications LLC. T-Moblie USA Inc. served on 3/12/2013, answer due 4/2/2013. (Johnson, Edmond)
March 13, 2013 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CallWave Communications LLC. T-Moblie USA Inc. served on 3/12/2013, answer due 4/2/2013. (Johnson, Edmond)
March 12, 2013 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to T-Moblie USA Inc. on 3/12/13. (cla, )
March 12, 2013 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to T-Moblie USA Inc. on 3/12/13. (cla, )
March 8, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney James F. Hurst, Scott R. Samay, Peter Lambrianakos, Krishnan Padmanabhan and Xi Chen filed by Google Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/8/2013. (nms)
March 8, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney James F. Hurst, Scott R. Samay, Peter Lambrianakos, Krishnan Padmanabhan and Xi Chen filed by Google Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/8/2013. (nms)
March 7, 2013 Filing 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney James F. Hurst, Scott R. Samay, Peter Lambrianakos, Krishnan Padmanabhan and Xi Chen - filed by Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul)
March 7, 2013 Filing 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney James F. Hurst, Scott R. Samay, Peter Lambrianakos, Krishnan Padmanabhan and Xi Chen - filed by Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul)
March 6, 2013 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance of Jack B. Blumenfeld and Paul Saindon on behalf of Google Inc. by Google Inc. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
March 6, 2013 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance of Jack B. Blumenfeld and Paul Saindon on behalf of Google Inc. by Google Inc. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
February 6, 2013 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Lauren Reznick for CallWave Communications LLC,Lauren Reznick for CallWave Communications LLC,Lauren Reznick for CallWave Communications LLC added for electronic noticing. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA(els)
February 6, 2013 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Lauren Reznick for CallWave Communications LLC,Lauren Reznick for CallWave Communications LLC,Lauren Reznick for CallWave Communications LLC added for electronic noticing. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA(els)
February 5, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Lauren Reznick filed by CallWave Communications LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/5/2013. (nms)
February 5, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Lauren Reznick filed by CallWave Communications LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/5/2013. (nms)
February 4, 2013 Filing 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Lauren Reznick - filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Lauren Reznick, Esq.)(McMillan, James)
February 4, 2013 Filing 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Lauren Reznick - filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Lauren Reznick, Esq.)(McMillan, James)
January 31, 2013 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by CallWave Communications LLC: For Google Inc. waiver sent on 1/30/2013, answer due 4/1/2013. (Johnson, Edmond)
January 31, 2013 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by CallWave Communications LLC: For Google Inc. waiver sent on 1/30/2013, answer due 4/1/2013. (Johnson, Edmond)
December 26, 2012 Pro Hac Vice Attorney William D. Belanger for CallWave Communications LLC added for electronic noticing. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA(dmp, )
December 26, 2012 Pro Hac Vice Attorney William D. Belanger for CallWave Communications LLC added for electronic noticing. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA(dmp, )
December 21, 2012 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Benjamin Snitkoff for CallWave Communications LLC,Benjamin Snitkoff for CallWave Communications LLC,Benjamin Snitkoff for CallWave Communications LLC,Benjamin Snitkoff for CallWave Communications LLC added for electronic noticing. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA(rbe)
December 21, 2012 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Noah V. Malgeri for CallWave Communications LLC,Noah V. Malgeri for CallWave Communications LLC,Noah V. Malgeri for CallWave Communications LLC,Noah V. Malgeri for CallWave Communications LLC added for electronic noticing. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA(rbe)
December 21, 2012 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Benjamin Snitkoff for CallWave Communications LLC,Benjamin Snitkoff for CallWave Communications LLC,Benjamin Snitkoff for CallWave Communications LLC,Benjamin Snitkoff for CallWave Communications LLC added for electronic noticing. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA(rbe)
December 21, 2012 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Noah V. Malgeri for CallWave Communications LLC,Noah V. Malgeri for CallWave Communications LLC,Noah V. Malgeri for CallWave Communications LLC,Noah V. Malgeri for CallWave Communications LLC added for electronic noticing. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA(rbe)
December 20, 2012 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney William D. Belanger, Noah V. Malgeri, Benjamin M. Snitkoff filed by CallWave Communications LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/20/2012. (nms)
December 20, 2012 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney William D. Belanger, Noah V. Malgeri, Benjamin M. Snitkoff filed by CallWave Communications LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/20/2012. (nms)
December 19, 2012 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA (rjb)
December 19, 2012 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA (rjb)
December 17, 2012 Filing 4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney William D. Belanger, Noah V. Malgeri, Benjamin M. Snitkoff - filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certification of William D. Belanger, #2 Certification of Noah V. Malgeri, #3 Certification of Benjamin M. Snitkoff)(Johnson, Edmond)
December 17, 2012 Filing 4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney William D. Belanger, Noah V. Malgeri, Benjamin M. Snitkoff - filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of William D. Belanger, # 2 Certification of Noah V. Malgeri, # 3 Certification of Benjamin M. Snitkoff)(Johnson, Edmond)
December 12, 2012 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,771,970 B1; 7,907,933 B1;. (els)
December 12, 2012 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,771,970 B1; 7,907,933 B1;. (els)
December 12, 2012 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction (els)
December 12, 2012 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction (els)
December 12, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Google Inc., T-Moblie USA Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0311-1190013.) - filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(els)
December 12, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Google Inc., T-Moblie USA Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0311-1190013.) - filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(els)
December 12, 2012 No Summons Issued (els)
December 12, 2012 No Summons Issued (els)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CallWave Communication LLC v. T-Moblie USA Inc. et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Inc.
Represented By: Nathaniel T. Browand
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: James F. Hurst
Represented By: Xi Chen
Represented By: Ashlee Lin
Represented By: Mark C. Scarsi
Represented By: Christopher J. Gaspar
Represented By: Dat Nguyen
Represented By: Peter Lambrianakos
Represented By: Scott R. Samay
Represented By: Krishnan Padmanabhan
Represented By: Philip T. Chen
Represented By: Paul Saindon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T-Moblie USA Inc.
Represented By: Imran A. Khaliq
Represented By: Mark L. Hogge
Represented By: Kirk R. Ruthenberg
Represented By: Juanita DeLoach
Represented By: Ramsey M. Al-Salam
Represented By: Ryan Patrick Newell
Represented By: Arthur G. Connolly, III
Represented By: Mary I. Akhimien
Represented By: Shailendra K. Maheshwari
Represented By: Kaustuv M. Das
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special master: Yvonne Takvorian Saville, -SM-
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CallWave Communications LLC
Represented By: Gregory S. Bishop
Represented By: Benjamin Snitkoff
Represented By: James Gordon McMillan, III
Represented By: Christopher Boundy
Represented By: Noah V. Malgeri
Represented By: William D. Belanger
Represented By: Charles F. Koch
Represented By: Lauren Reznick
Represented By: Suparna Datta
Represented By: Leah R. McCoy
Represented By: Edmond D. Johnson
Represented By: LeinWeih A. Tseng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?