CallWave Communication LLC v. Verizon Communications Inc. et al. Featured Case
Plaintiff: CallWave Communications LLC
Defendant: Verizon Communications Inc., Google Inc. and Cellco Partnership
Case Number: 1:2012cv01704
Filed: December 12, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Andrews
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2017 Filing 710 MANDATE of USCA as to 685 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit), filed by CallWave Communications LLC. USCA Decision: The stay of proceedings is lifted. The motion is granted. The appeals are dismissed. Each side shall bear its own costs. (nms)
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 709 SO ORDERED Granting (757 in 12-cv-1701-RGA, 666 in 12-cv-1702-RGA, 708 in 12-cv-1704-RGA) Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/24/2017. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(nms)
October 24, 2017 Filing 708 STIPULATION of Dismissal by CallWave Communications LLC. (Herrmann, Douglas)
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 707 ORDER of USCA for the Federal Circuit. Decision of USCA: The Unopposed Motion to amend the caption is Granted. (nms)
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 706 ORDER Denying without prejudice Motion for Vacatur (751 in 12-cv-1701-RGA, 661 in 12-cv-1702-RGA, 325 in 12-cv-1788-RGA, 377 in 12-cv-1703-RGA, 702 in 12-cv-1704-RGA). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/10/2017. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
October 4, 2017 Filing 705 Amended Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Alphabet Inc., Corporate Parent XXVI Holdings Inc. for Google LLC, Google LLC, Google LLC filed by Google LLC. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 704 SO ORDERED Granting (752 in 12-cv-1701-RGA, 703 in 12-cv-1704-RGA, 662 in 12-cv-1702-RGA) Stipulation and Order to Reflect Name Change from Google Inc. to Google LLC and to Update Caption. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/4/2017. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(nms)
October 3, 2017 Filing 703 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order to Reflect Name Change from Google Inc. to Google LLC and to Update Caption by Google Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
September 14, 2017 Filing 702 MOTION for Vacatur - filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (Herrmann, Douglas) Modified on 9/14/2017 (nms).
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 701 ORDER of USCA as to 737 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit), filed by CallWave Communications LLC. Decision of USCA: (1) The motion to remand is granted to the limited extent (as explained). The court retains jurisdiction over the appeals at this time. (2) Proceedings in these appeals are stayed pending the district court's ruling on the motion to vacate. Within seven days from the date of the district court's ruling on the motion, the parties are directed to inform this court how they believe these appeals should proceed. (3) Google's motion for an extension of time is denied as moot (*see Order for further details). (nms)
July 28, 2017 Filing 700 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,771,970 B1; 7,907,933 B1; 7,636,428 B2; 7,882,188 B1; 8,064,588 B2. (Attachments: # 1 Order)(nms)
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 699 SO ORDERED Granting (D.I. 658 in 12-cv-1702-RGA, D.I. 698 in 12-cv-1704-RGA, D.I. 747 in 12-cv-1701-RGA) Stipulation of Dismissal (***Civil Case Terminated). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/28/2017. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(nms)
July 27, 2017 Filing 698 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Google Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 697 ORAL ORDER: The request to CANCEL the hearing set for 7/31/2017 (D.I. 696 in 12-cv-1704-RGA, 745 in 12-cv-1701-RGA, and 656 in 12-cv-1702-RGA), is GRANTED. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/25/2017. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(nms)
July 24, 2017 Filing 696 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding July 31 afternoon hearing. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
July 18, 2017 Filing 695 Letter to Honorable Richard G. Andrews from James G. McMillan, III regarding hyperlinked copies of briefs. (McMillan, James) Modified on 7/18/2017 (nms).
June 22, 2017 Filing 694 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding hyperlinked briefs. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 693 ORAL ORDER: The parties are requested to promptly submit hyperlinked versions of the briefs associated with all pending motions. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/15/2017. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:13-cv-00711-RGA(nms)
May 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 692 ORAL ORDER: Oral argument on the pending Motions for Summary Judgment is now set for 7/31/2017, at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/26/2017. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(nms)
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 691 ORDER of Dismissal relating to U.S. Patent No. 6,771,970. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/18/2017. (nms)
April 18, 2017 Filing 690 STIPULATION of Dismissal, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(McMillan, James) Modified on 4/18/2017 (nms).
February 16, 2017 Filing 689 MANDATE of USCA as to 501 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit), filed by CallWave Communications LLC. USCA Decision: USDC Decision Affirmed. (Attachments: # 1 Judgment)(nms)
February 14, 2017 Filing 688 NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA for the Federal Circuit re 685 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit), filed by CallWave Communications LLC. USCA Case Number 17cv1634. (nms)
February 14, 2017 Filing 687 Official Transcript of Motion to Compel Settlement held on 02-02-17 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leonard A. Dibbs. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/7/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/17/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/15/2017. (lad)
February 13, 2017 Filing 686 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by CallWave Communications LLC for proceedings held on January 12, 2017 before Judge Richard G. Andrews, Transcript is Already on File. (McMillan, James)
February 13, 2017 Filing 685 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Federal Circuit of 680 Order, 562 Order, 683 Memorandum Opinion, 206 Order, 682 Judgment, 203 Memorandum Opinion, . Appeal filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 684 MEMORANDUM ORDER Granting 658 MOTION to Enforce Settlement Agreement. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/13/2017. (nms)
February 13, 2017 APPEAL - Credit Card Payment of $505.00 received re 685 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit) filed by CallWave Communications LLC. ( Filing fee $505, receipt number 0311-2084116.) (McMillan, James)
February 13, 2017 Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit re 685 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit). (nmg)
February 13, 2017 Notification regarding 685 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit) sent to Reporter Dibbs (nmg)
February 2, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Andrews - Oral Argument held on 2/2/2017. Appearances: W. Belanger, M. Bigelow, J. McMillan for Plaintiffs; J. Schnurer, B. Schladweiler for Defendants. (Court Reporter Leonard Dibbs.) (ksr, )
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 682 FINAL JUDGMENT regarding claims of infringement of claims 14-17 and 19 of U.S. Patent No. 6,771,970. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/12/2017. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
January 11, 2017 Filing 681 PROPOSED Final Judgment, by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James) Modified on 1/12/2017 (nms).
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 680 ORDER Granting Unopposed MOTION for Entry of Separate and Final Judgment Pursuant to Rule 54(b) (D.I. 731 in 12-cv-1701-RGA, D.I. 665 in 12-cv-1704-RGA, D.I. 310 in 12-cv-1788-RGA). Plaintiff is DIRECTED to submit within five days a jointly agreed order (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/6/2017. Associated Cases: 12-cv-1701-RGA, 12-cv-1704-RGA, 12-cv-1788-RGA(nms)
December 22, 2016 Filing 679 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Paul Saindon as co-counsel. Reason for request: No longer with firm. (Saindon, Paul)
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 678 ORAL ORDER: Oral argument on the Motion to Enforce Settlement (D.I. 658 ) is now set for 2/2/2017, at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/20/2016. (nms)
December 20, 2016 Filing 677 REDACTED VERSION of 674 Reply Brief, by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James) Modified on 12/20/2016 (nms).
December 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 676 ORAL ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (D.I. 649 in 12cv1701-RGA, D.I. 567 in 12cv1702-RGA, and D.I. 576 in 12cv1704-RGA) is DENIED. Plaintiff has not established that Defendant's Motion was untimely or that Defendant waived the defense. Even if the Motion were untimely, Plaintiff has not shown prejudice or bad faith to support the extreme sanction of striking this motion. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/16/2016. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(nms)
December 14, 2016 Filing 675 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from James G. McMillan, III regarding Callwave's request for oral argument. (McMillan, James) Modified on 12/14/2016 (nms).
December 14, 2016 Filing 674 [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re 658 MOTION to Enforce Settlement Agreement filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(McMillan, James)
December 8, 2016 Filing 673 REDACTED VERSION of 669 Declaration of John P. Schnurer, by Telecommunication Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Schladweiler, Benjamin) Modified on 12/8/2016 (nms).
December 8, 2016 Filing 672 REDACTED VERSION of 668 Memorandum in Opposition by Telecommunication Systems, Inc.. (Schladweiler, Benjamin)
December 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 671 ORDER Granting 667 Unopposed Motion to Intervene by Non-Party TeleCommunication Systems, Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/1/2016. (nms)
November 30, 2016 Filing 670 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 658 MOTION to Enforce Settlement Agreement filed by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Services Corp..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 12/12/2016. (Schladweiler, Benjamin)
November 30, 2016 Filing 669 [SEALED] DECLARATION of John P. Schnurer re 668 Memorandum in Opposition, by Telecommunication Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Schladweiler, Benjamin) Modified on 12/1/2016 (nms).
November 30, 2016 Filing 668 [SEALED] MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 658 MOTION to Enforce Settlement Agreement filed by Telecommunication Systems, Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 12/12/2016. (Schladweiler, Benjamin)
November 30, 2016 Filing 667 Unopposed Motion to Intervene by Non-Party TeleCommunication Systems, Inc. - filed by Telecommunication Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Schladweiler, Benjamin) Modified on 12/1/2016 (nms).
November 22, 2016 Filing 666 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to file Brief in Opposition to Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement and Reply in Support of Motion to November 30, 2016 and December 14, 2016 - filed by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Services Corp.. (Schladweiler, Benjamin)
November 22, 2016 Filing 665 Unopposed MOTION for Entry of Separate and Final Judgment Pursuant to Rule 54(b) - filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James) Modified on 11/22/2016 (nms).
November 22, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 666 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to file Briefs regarding Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement, filed by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Services Corp. (Reset Briefing Schedule: re 658 MOTION to Enforce Settlement Agreement. Answering Brief due 11/30/2016, Reply Brief due 12/14/2016). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/22/2016. (nms)
November 16, 2016 Filing 664 REDACTED VERSION of 661 Declaration of William D. Belanger, by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James) Modified on 11/16/2016 (nms).
November 16, 2016 Filing 663 REDACTED VERSION of 660 Declaration of Megan E. L. Bigelow, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-12)(McMillan, James) Modified on 11/16/2016 (nms).
November 16, 2016 Filing 662 REDACTED VERSION of 659 Opening Brief in Support, by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James) Modified on 11/16/2016 (nms).
November 9, 2016 Filing 661 [SEALED] DECLARATION of William D. Belanger re 658 MOTION to Enforce Settlement Agreement, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(McMillan, James) Modified on 11/10/2016 (nms).
November 9, 2016 Filing 660 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Megan E. L. Bigelow re 658 MOTION to Enforce Settlement Agreement, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-12, # 2 Certificate of Service)(McMillan, James) Modified on 11/10/2016 (nms).
November 9, 2016 Filing 659 [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re 658 MOTION to Enforce Settlement Agreement, filed by CallWave Communications LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 11/28/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(McMillan, James) Modified on 11/10/2016 (nms).
November 9, 2016 Filing 658 MOTION to Enforce Settlement Agreement - filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 7.1.1 Statement)(McMillan, James) Modified on 11/10/2016 (nms).
November 2, 2016 Filing 657 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from James G. McMillan, III regarding Callwave's request for oral argument on its Motion to Strike Google, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment That All Asserted Claims of the Patents-In-Suit Are Invalid Under § 101. (McMillan, James)
November 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 656 SO ORDERED Granting (654 in 12-cv-1704-RGA, 645 in 12-cv-1702-RGA, 727 in 12-cv-1701-RGA) Stipulation and Order withdrawing motion. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/1/2016. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(nms)
October 31, 2016 Filing 655 Joint STATUS Letter, by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James) Modified on 11/1/2016 (nms).
October 31, 2016 Filing 654 STIPULATION to Withdraw Motion to Strike Googles Undisclosed Invalidity Defense Under 35 U.S.C. § 102(g), by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James) Modified on 11/1/2016 (nms).
October 31, 2016 Filing 653 REPLY BRIEF re 576 MOTION to Strike Motion for Summary Judgment that All Asserted Claims of the Patents-In-Suit are Invalid Under Section 101, filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits I-K, # 2 Exhibit L, # 3 Exhibits M-N)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/31/2016 (nms).
October 31, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (643 in 12-cv-1702-RGA, 725 in 12-cv-1701-RGA, 397 in 13-cv-711-RGA, 652 in 12-cv-1704-RGA) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for joint status report to October 31, 2016, filed by CallWave Communications LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/31/2016. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:13-cv-00711-RGA(nms)
October 31, 2016 CORRECTING ENTRY: The link and docket text in D.I. 653 have been corrected to reflect a relationship to the correct motion they are in reference to. (nms) Modified on 10/31/2016 (nms).
October 28, 2016 Filing 652 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for joint status report to October 31, 2016 - filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James)
October 28, 2016 Filing 651 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from James G. McMillan, III regarding Callwave's request for oral argument. (McMillan, James) Modified on 10/31/2016 (nms).
October 28, 2016 Filing 650 REDACTED VERSION of 633 Declaration, by Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul) Modified on 10/31/2016 (nms).
October 28, 2016 Filing 649 REDACTED VERSION of 631 Declaration, by Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul) Modified on 10/31/2016 (nms).
October 28, 2016 Filing 648 REDACTED VERSION of 630 Reply Brief, by Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul) Modified on 10/31/2016 (nms).
October 28, 2016 Filing 647 REDACTED VERSION of 628 Declaration, by Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul) Modified on 10/31/2016 (nms).
October 28, 2016 Filing 646 REDACTED VERSION of 626 Reply Brief, by Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul) Modified on 10/31/2016 (nms).
October 28, 2016 Filing 645 REDACTED VERSION of 625 Reply Brief, by Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul) Modified on 10/31/2016 (nms).
October 28, 2016 Filing 644 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Paul Saindon regarding Google's request for oral argument on pending motions. (Saindon, Paul) Modified on 10/31/2016 (nms).
October 27, 2016 CORRECTING ENTRY: The docket text and pdf for the Reply Brief filed on 10/21/2016, relating to the Testimony by CallWave's Experts Philip Green and David Lucantoni has been amended per counsel's request. The filing is now under seal. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA(nms)
October 26, 2016 Filing 643 REDACTED VERSION of 624 Declaration of Dat Nguyen, by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-B)(Saindon, Paul) Modified on 10/27/2016 (nms).
October 26, 2016 Filing 642 REDACTED VERSION of 629 Reply Brief, by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James) Modified on 10/26/2016 (nms).
October 25, 2016 Filing 641 REDACTED VERSION of 622 Exhibits H, Part 2, I, Parts 1-2, and J-L, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit H, Part 2, # 2 Exhibit I, Part 1, # 3 Exhibit I, Part 2, # 4 Exhibit J, # 5 Exhibit K, # 6 Exhibit L)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/25/2016 (nms).
October 25, 2016 Filing 640 REDACTED VERSION of 621 Exhibits G, Parts 1-2, and H, Part 1, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit G, Part 1.1, # 2 Exhibit G, Part 1.2, # 3 Exhibit G, Part 2, # 4 Exhibit H, Part 1)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/25/2016 (nms).
October 25, 2016 Filing 639 REDACTED VERSION of 620 Exhibit E Parts 1, 2, and 3, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit E, Part 1, # 2 Exhibit E, Part 2, # 3 Exhibit E, Part 3)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/25/2016 (nms).
October 25, 2016 Filing 638 REDACTED VERSION of 619 Exhibit D, Part 2, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit D, Part 2)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/25/2016 (nms).
October 25, 2016 Filing 637 REDACTED VERSION of 618 Exhibit D, Part 1, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit D, Part 1)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/25/2016 (nms).
October 25, 2016 Filing 636 REDACTED VERSION of 617 Exhibit C, Part 4, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit C, Part 4)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/25/2016 (nms).
October 25, 2016 Filing 635 REDACTED VERSION of 616 Exhibits B, C Part 1, C Part 2 and C Part 3, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B, Part 1, # 2 Exhibit B, Part 2, # 3 Exhibit C, Part 1, # 4 Exhibit C, Part 2, # 5 Exhibit C, Part 3a, # 6 Exhibit C, Part 3b)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/25/2016 (nms).
October 24, 2016 Filing 634 NOTICE of Joinder in BroadSoft's Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity, by Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul) Modified on 10/25/2016 (nms).
October 21, 2016 Filing 633 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Nathaniel T. Browand re 632 Reply Brief, by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-4)(Saindon, Paul) Modified on 10/24/2016 (nms).
October 21, 2016 Filing 632 REPLY BRIEF re 542 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of All Asserted Claims of the '110, '910, and '901 Patents Based on Prior Art filed by Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul)
October 21, 2016 Filing 631 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Dat Nguyen re 630 Reply Brief, by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 11-17)(Saindon, Paul) Modified on 10/24/2016 (nms).
October 21, 2016 Filing 630 [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re 548 MOTION to Preclude Expert Testimony of Dr. David Lucantoni on Conception, Reduction to Practice, Diligence, Secondary Considerations of Non-Obviousness, and U.S. Patent No. 6,353,660 (Burger) filed by Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul)
October 21, 2016 Filing 629 [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re 554 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of W. Christopher Bakewell filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James)
October 21, 2016 Filing 628 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Nathaniel T. Browand re 627 Reply Brief, by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-2)(Saindon, Paul) Modified on 10/24/2016 (nms).
October 21, 2016 Filing 627 REPLY BRIEF re 545 MOTION for Summary Judgment that All Asserted Claims of the Patents-In-Suit are Invalid Under Section 101 filed by Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul)
October 21, 2016 Filing 626 SEALED REPLY BRIEF re 551 MOTION to Preclude Testimony by CallWave's Experts Philip Green and David Lucantoni Concerning Alleged Damages, filed by Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul) Modified on 10/27/2016 (nms). (Main Document 626 replaced on 10/27/2016) (nms).
October 21, 2016 Filing 625 [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re 556 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Based on BroadWorks and Joinder in BroadSoft's Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity filed by Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul)
October 20, 2016 Filing 624 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Dat Nguyen re 623 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-B)(Saindon, Paul) Modified on 10/21/2016 (nms).
October 20, 2016 Filing 623 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 576 MOTION to Strike Motion for Summary Judgment that All Asserted Claims of the Patents-In-Suit are Invalid Under Section 101 filed by Google Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 10/31/2016. (Saindon, Paul)
October 19, 2016 Filing 622 [SEALED] EXHIBITS to 610 Opening Brief in Support, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit H Part 2, # 2 Exhibit I Part 1, # 3 Exhibit I Part 2, # 4 Exhibit J, # 5 Exhibit K, # 6 Exhibit L)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/19/2016 (nms).
October 19, 2016 Filing 621 [SEALED] EXHIBITS to 610 Opening Brief in Support, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit G Part 1, # 2 Exhibit G Part 2, # 3 Exhibit H Part 1)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/19/2016 (nms).
October 19, 2016 Filing 620 [SEALED] EXHIBITS to 610 Opening Brief in Support, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit E Part 1, # 2 Exhibit E Part 2, # 3 Exhibit E Part 3)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/19/2016 (nms).
October 19, 2016 Filing 619 [SEALED] EXHIBITS to 610 Opening Brief in Support, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit D Part 2)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/19/2016 (nms).
October 19, 2016 Filing 618 [SEALED] EXHIBITS to 610 Opening Brief in Support, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit D Part 1)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/19/2016 (nms).
October 19, 2016 Filing 617 [SEALED] EXHIBITS to 610 Opening Brief in Support, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit C Part 4)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/19/2016 (nms).
October 19, 2016 Filing 616 [SEALED] EXHIBITS to 610 Opening Brief in Support, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B, # 2 Exhibit C Part 1, # 3 Exhibit C Part 2, # 4 Exhibit C Part 3a, # 5 Exhibit C Part 3b)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/19/2016 (nms).
October 19, 2016 Filing 615 EXHIBITS to 610 Opening Brief in Support, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit F, # 2 Exhibit M, # 3 Exhibit N, # 4 Exhibit O, # 5 Exhibit P)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/19/2016 (nms).
October 19, 2016 Filing 614 EXHIBIT A, part 4 to 610 Opening Brief in Support, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Part 4)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/19/2016 (nms).
October 19, 2016 Filing 613 EXHIBIT A, part 3 to 610 Opening Brief in Support, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Part 3)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/19/2016 (nms).
October 19, 2016 Filing 612 EXHIBIT A, part 2 to 610 Opening Brief in Support, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Part 2)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/19/2016 (nms).
October 19, 2016 Filing 611 EXHIBIT A, part 1 to 610 Opening Brief in Support, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Part 1)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/19/2016 (nms).
October 19, 2016 CORRECTING ENTRY: The exhibits filed at D.I. 611 and D.I. 612 have been removed from the docket. Counsel shall re-file the exhibits as a multi-volume filing. (nms)
October 18, 2016 Filing 610 OPENING BRIEF in Support re 609 MOTION to Strike Googles Undisclosed Invalidity Defense Under 35 U.S.C. § 102(g), filed by CallWave Communications LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 11/4/2016. (McMillan, James) Modified on 10/19/2016 (nms).
October 18, 2016 Filing 609 MOTION to Strike Googles Undisclosed Invalidity Defense Under 35 U.S.C. § 102(g) - filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James) Modified on 10/19/2016 (nms).
October 11, 2016 Filing 608 REDACTED VERSION of 588 Exhibits B, C, G & H to Declaration of Gregory S. Bishop, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits B, C, G and H)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/11/2016 (nms).
October 11, 2016 Filing 607 REDACTED VERSION of 586 Answering Brief in Opposition, by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James) Modified on 10/11/2016 (nms).
October 10, 2016 Filing 606 REDACTED VERSION of 590 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul) Modified on 10/11/2016 (nms).
October 10, 2016 Filing 605 REDACTED VERSION of 597 Exhibits A-B to Declaration of L. Andrew Tseng, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-B)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/11/2016 (nms).
October 10, 2016 Filing 604 REDACTED VERSION of 595 Answering Brief in Opposition, by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James) Modified on 10/11/2016 (nms).
October 6, 2016 Filing 603 REDACTED VERSION of 583 Exhibits B-F to Declaration of Megan E. L. Bigelow, by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James) Modified on 10/7/2016 (nms).
October 6, 2016 Filing 602 REDACTED VERSION of 581 Answering Brief in Opposition, by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James) Modified on 10/7/2016 (nms).
October 6, 2016 Filing 601 REDACTED VERSION of 594 Exhibits B, D, and I to Declaration of Suparna Datta, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits B-I)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/7/2016 (nms).
October 6, 2016 Filing 600 REDACTED VERSION of 591 Declaration of Dr. David Lucantoni, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix B)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/7/2016 (nms).
October 6, 2016 Filing 599 REDACTED VERSION of 589 Answering Brief in Opposition, by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James) Modified on 10/7/2016 (nms).
October 6, 2016 Filing 598 REDACTED VERSION of 578 Exhibits G and H in support of Memorandum in support, by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James) Modified on 10/7/2016 (nms).
October 5, 2016 CORRECTING ENTRY: The Notice of Appearance filed at D.I. 580 on 10/4/2016, has been removed from the docket. This filing was done in error. (nms)
October 4, 2016 Filing 597 [SEALED] EXHIBITS re 596 Declaration of L. Andrew Tseng, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-B, # 2 Certificate of Service)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/5/2016 (nms).
October 4, 2016 Filing 596 DECLARATION of L. Andrew Tseng re 595 Answering Brief in Opposition, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit C)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/5/2016 (nms).
October 4, 2016 Filing 595 [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 556 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Based on BroadWorks and Joinder in BroadSoft's Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity filed by CallWave Communications LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 10/14/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(McMillan, James)
October 4, 2016 Filing 594 [SEALED] EXHIBITS re 593 Declaration of Suparna Datta, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B, # 2 Exhibit D, # 3 Exhibit I, # 4 Certificate of Service)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/5/2016 (nms).
October 4, 2016 Filing 593 DECLARATION of Suparna Datta re 589 Answering Brief in Opposition, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit C, # 3 Exhibit E, # 4 Exhibit F, # 5 Exhibit G, # 6 Exhibit H)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/5/2016 (nms).
October 4, 2016 Filing 592 APPENDIX re 591 Declaration of Dr. David Lucantoni, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A, # 2 Appendicies C-H)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/5/2016 (nms). Modified on 10/5/2016 (nms).
October 4, 2016 Filing 591 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Dr. David Lucantoni re 589 Answering Brief in Opposition, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix B, # 2 Certificate of Service)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/5/2016 (nms).
October 4, 2016 Filing 590 [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 554 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of W. Christopher Bakewell filed by Google Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 10/14/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-3, # 2 Exhibits 4-8)(Saindon, Paul)
October 4, 2016 Filing 589 [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 542 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of All Asserted Claims of the '110, '910, and '901 Patents Based on Prior Art filed by CallWave Communications LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 10/14/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(McMillan, James)
October 4, 2016 Filing 588 [SEALED] EXHIBITS re 587 Declaration of Gregory S. Bishop, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B, # 2 Exhibit C, # 3 Exhibit G, # 4 Exhibit H, # 5 Certificate of Service)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/5/2016 (nms).
October 4, 2016 Filing 587 DECLARATION of Gregory S. Bishop re 586 Answering Brief in Opposition, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit D, # 3 Exhibit E, # 4 Exhibit F)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/5/2016 (nms).
October 4, 2016 Filing 586 [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 548 MOTION to Preclude Expert Testimony of Dr. David Lucantoni on Conception, Reduction to Practice, Diligence, Secondary Considerations of Non-Obviousness, and U.S. Patent No. 6,353,660 (Burger) filed by CallWave Communications LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 10/14/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(McMillan, James)
October 4, 2016 Filing 585 DECLARATION of Gregory S. Bishop re 584 Answering Brief in Opposition, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/5/2016 (nms).
October 4, 2016 Filing 584 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 545 MOTION for Summary Judgment that All Asserted Claims of the Patents-In-Suit are Invalid Under Section 101 filed by CallWave Communications LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 10/14/2016. (McMillan, James)
October 4, 2016 Filing 583 [SEALED] EXHIBITS re 582 Declaration of Megan E.L. Bigelow, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B, # 2 Exhibit C, # 3 Exhibit D, # 4 Exhibit E, # 5 Exhibit F, # 6 Certificate of Service)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/5/2016 (nms).
October 4, 2016 Filing 582 DECLARATION of Megan E. L. Bigelow re 581 Answering Brief in Opposition, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit G)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/5/2016 (nms).
October 4, 2016 Filing 581 [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 551 MOTION to Preclude Testimony by CallWave's Experts Philip Green and David Lucantoni Concerning Alleged Damages filed by CallWave Communications LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 10/14/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(McMillan, James)
October 3, 2016 Filing 579 7.1.1 Certification re 576 Motion to Strike, by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James) Modified on 10/4/2016 (nms).
October 3, 2016 Filing 578 [SEALED] EXHIBITS re 577 Opening Brief in Support, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit G, # 2 Exhibit H, # 3 Certificate of Service)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/4/2016 (nms).
October 3, 2016 Filing 577 OPENING BRIEF in Support re 576 MOTION to Strike Motion for Summary Judgment that All Asserted Claims of the Patents-In-Suit are Invalid Under Section 101, filed by CallWave Communications LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 10/20/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-F)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/4/2016 (nms).
October 3, 2016 Filing 576 MOTION to Strike Motion for Summary Judgment that All Asserted Claims of the Patents-In-Suit are Invalid Under Section 101 - filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James) Modified on 10/4/2016 (nms).
September 30, 2016 Filing 575 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Noah V. Malgeri as co-counsel. Reason for request: he is no longer with the firm.. (McMillan, James)
September 27, 2016 Filing 574 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Leah R. McCoy as co-counsel. Reason for request: no longer with the firm. (McMillan, James)
September 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 573 ORDER re (645 in 12-cv-1701-RGA, 306 in 12-cv-1788-RGA, 572 in 12-cv-1704-RGA) Stipulation and Order adjourning the scheduling order deadlines relating to the '970 Patent. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/22/2016. Associated Cases: 12-cv-1701-RGA, 12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
September 22, 2016 Filing 572 STIPULATION to Adjourn Remaining Deadlines set forth in the Amended Scheduling Order of all Asserted Claims of the '970 Patent by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James)
September 16, 2016 Filing 571 REDACTED VERSION of 559 Exhibits, by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James) Modified on 9/19/2016 (nms).
September 16, 2016 Filing 570 REDACTED VERSION of 555 Opening Brief in Support, by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James) Modified on 9/19/2016 (nms).
September 16, 2016 Filing 569 REDACTED VERSION of 556 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Based on BroadWorks and Joinder in BroadSoft's Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity, by Google Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 9/19/2016 (nms).
September 16, 2016 Filing 568 REDACTED VERSION of 553 Declaration, by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-7)(Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 9/19/2016 (nms).
September 16, 2016 Filing 567 REDACTED VERSION of 552 Opening Brief in Support, by Google Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 9/19/2016 (nms).
September 16, 2016 Filing 566 REDACTED VERSION of 550 Declaration, by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-10)(Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 9/19/2016 (nms).
September 16, 2016 Filing 565 REDACTED VERSION of 549 Opening Brief in Support, by Google Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 9/19/2016 (nms).
September 16, 2016 Filing 564 REDACTED VERSION of 544 Declaration, by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibits 4-16)(Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 9/19/2016 (nms).
September 16, 2016 Filing 563 REDACTED VERSION of 543 Opening Brief in Support, by Google Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 9/19/2016 (nms).
September 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 562 ORDER Granting Renewed Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings that All Asserted Claims of the '970 Patent are Invalid under Section 101 (D.I. 439 in 12-1701, D.I. 419 in 12-cv-1704-RGA, D.I. 249 in 12-cv-1788-RGA). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/15/2016. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
September 15, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (633 in 12-cv-1701-RGA, 561 in 12-cv-1704-RGA, 319 in 13-cv-711-RGA, 555 in 12-cv-1702-RGA) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Responses to Motions for Summary Judgment, Daubert Motions, and Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and Reply Briefs to October 4, 2016, and October 21, 2016, filed by CallWave Communications LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/15/2016. Associated Cases: 12-cv-1701-RGA, 12-cv-1702-RGA, 12-cv-1704-RGA, 13-cv-711-RGA(nms)
September 14, 2016 Filing 561 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Responses to Motions for Summary Judgment, Daubert Motions, and Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and Reply Briefs to October 4, 2016 and October 21, 2016 - filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James)
September 14, 2016 Filing 560 NOTICE Regarding Joinder in Broadsoft's Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity by Google Inc. (see Motion and Joinder filed at D.I. 556 ). (Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 9/14/2016 (nms).
September 12, 2016 Filing 559 [SEALED] EXHIBITS to 555 Opening Brief in Support, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit C, # 3 Exhibit D Part 1, # 4 Exhibit D Part 2, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H)(McMillan, James) Modified on 9/12/2016 (nms).
September 12, 2016 CORRECTING ENTRY: The Notice of Multi-Media filing (D.I. 557) has been removed from the docket. Counsel has been advised as to how to proceed with the filing, and shall do so accordingly (nms)
September 12, 2016 CORRECTING ENTRY: D.I. 559 and 560 have been removed from the docket. Counsel shall re-file the exhibits used at these entries all together at one docket item entry. (nms)
September 12, 2016 CORRECTING ENTRY: The pdf for D.I. 546 has been replaced per counsel's request. The table of contents has been corrected. (nms)
September 12, 2016 CORRECTING ENTRY: The pdf for D.I. 543 has been replaced with a corrected version per counsel's request. (nms)
September 9, 2016 Filing 558 EXHIBITS re 555 Opening Brief in Support, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B, # 2 Exhibit I)(McMillan, James) Modified on 9/12/2016 (nms).
September 9, 2016 Filing 556 [SEALED] MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Based on BroadWorks and Joinder in BroadSoft's Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity - filed by Google Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 9/12/2016 (nms).
September 9, 2016 Filing 555 [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re 554 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of W. Christopher Bakewell, filed by CallWave Communications LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 9/26/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(McMillan, James) Modified on 9/12/2016 (nms).
September 9, 2016 Filing 554 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of W. Christopher Bakewell - filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 7.1.1 Statement)(McMillan, James) Modified on 9/12/2016 (nms).
September 9, 2016 Filing 553 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Dat Nguyen re 551 MOTION to Preclude Testimony by CallWave's Experts Philip Green and David Lucantoni Concerning Alleged Damages, by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-7)(Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 9/12/2016 (nms).
September 9, 2016 Filing 552 [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re 551 MOTION to Preclude Testimony by CallWave's Experts Philip Green and David Lucantoni Concerning Alleged Damages, filed by Google Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 9/26/2016. (Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 9/12/2016 (nms).
September 9, 2016 Filing 551 MOTION to Preclude Testimony by CallWave's Experts Philip Green and David Lucantoni Concerning Alleged Damages - filed by Google Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 9/12/2016 (nms).
September 9, 2016 Filing 550 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Dat Nguyen re 548 MOTION to Preclude Expert Testimony of Dr. David Lucantoni on Conception, Reduction to Practice, Diligence, Secondary Considerations of Non-Obviousness, and U.S. Patent No. 6,353,660 (Burger) by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-8, # 2 Exhibits 9-10)(Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 9/12/2016 (nms).
September 9, 2016 Filing 549 [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re 548 MOTION to Preclude Expert Testimony of Dr. David Lucantoni on Conception, Reduction to Practice, Diligence, Secondary Considerations of Non-Obviousness, and U.S. Patent No. 6,353,660 (Burger), filed by Google Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 9/26/2016. (Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 9/12/2016 (nms).
September 9, 2016 Filing 548 MOTION to Preclude Expert Testimony of Dr. David Lucantoni on Conception, Reduction to Practice, Diligence, Secondary Considerations of Non-Obviousness, and U.S. Patent No. 6,353,660 (Burger) - filed by Google Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 9/12/2016 (nms).
September 9, 2016 Filing 547 DECLARATION of Dat Nguyen re 545 MOTION for Summary Judgment that All Asserted Claims of the Patents-In-Suit are Invalid Under Section 101, by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-13)(Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 9/9/2016 (nms).
September 9, 2016 Filing 546 OPENING BRIEF in Support re 545 MOTION for Summary Judgment that All Asserted Claims of the Patents-In-Suit are Invalid Under Section 101, filed by Google Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 9/26/2016. (Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 9/9/2016 (nms). (Main Document 546 replaced on 9/12/2016) (nms).
September 9, 2016 Filing 545 MOTION for Summary Judgment that All Asserted Claims of the Patents-In-Suit are Invalid Under Section 101 - filed by Google Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 9/9/2016 (nms).
September 9, 2016 Filing 544 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Nathaniel T. Browand re 542 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of All Asserted Claims of the '110, '910, and '901 Patents Based on Prior Art, by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibits 4-12, # 5 Exhibits 13-16)(Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 9/9/2016 (nms).
September 9, 2016 Filing 543 [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re 542 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of All Asserted Claims of the '110, '910, and '901 Patents Based on Prior Art, filed by Google Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 9/26/2016. (Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 9/12/2016 (nms). (Main Document 543 replaced on 9/12/2016) (nms).
September 9, 2016 Filing 542 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of All Asserted Claims of the '110, '910, and '901 Patents Based on Prior Art - filed by Google Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 9/12/2016 (nms).
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 541 ORAL ORDER Adopting the Amended Schedule at D.I. 612 in 12-cv-1701-RGA, and D.I. 540 in 12-cv-1704-RGA. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/22/2016. Associated Cases: 12-cv-1701-RGA, 12-cv-1704-RGA(nms)
August 22, 2016 Filing 540 Letter to Judge Richard G. Andrews from Special Master Yvonne Takvorian Saville, dated 8/17/2016 advising of schedule. (ksr, )
August 16, 2016 Filing 539 NOTICE of Name Change and Email for Megan E. Lantto Pro Hac Vice by CallWave Communications LLC (McMillan, James)
August 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 538 SO ORDERED, Granting 537 Stipulation and Order to Stay Pending Settlement, filed by CallWave Communications LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/11/2016. (nms)
August 10, 2016 Filing 537 STIPULATION and Order to Stay Pending Settlement as to Verizon Services Corp. and Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless in the '970 Track by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James)
July 22, 2016 Filing 536 Notice Regarding the Scheduling Order for the '970 Track, by Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul) Modified on 7/25/2016 (nms).
July 22, 2016 Filing 535 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Verizon Services Corp. and Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless's Objections to Plaintiff's Amended First Collective Interrogatories to '970 Track Defendants (Nos. 1-7) filed by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Services Corp..(Schladweiler, Benjamin)
July 21, 2016 Filing 534 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Bryana T. McGillycuddy as co-counsel. Reason for request: She is no longer with the firm.. (McMillan, James)
July 15, 2016 Filing 533 NOTICE of Deposition and Subpoena of Samuel Hoffpauir by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Saindon, Paul)
July 12, 2016 Filing 532 NOTICE of Firm Telephone Number Change, by Paul Saindon (Saindon, Paul) Modified on 7/13/2016 (nms).
July 11, 2016 Filing 531 NOTICE of Change of Address by Paul Saindon (Saindon, Paul)
July 6, 2016 Filing 530 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Google Inc.'s Third Supplemental Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
June 27, 2016 Filing 529 Redaction version of (D.I. 509 in 12-cv-1702-RGA, D.I. 500 in 12-cv-1704-RGA, D.I. 523 in 12-cv-1701-RGA, D.I. 345 in 12-cv-01703-RGA) Sealed Transcript. (nms)
June 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 528 ORDER Granting CallWave Communications, LLC's Unopposed MOTION to Seal Confidential Portions of the Transcript of the Hearing Before Special Master Saville on February, 24, 2016. Signed by Special Master Yvonne Saville on 6/27/2016. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(nms)
June 27, 2016 CORRECTING ENTRY: The pdf for the Sealed Transcript of the February 24, 2016, conference before the Special Master has been replaced. The reference to Civil Action 13-711-RGA has been removed, and a reference to Civil Action 12-1703-RGA has been added. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(nms)
June 23, 2016 CORRECTING ENTRY: The pdf for exhibits A-D attached to the redacted filing dated 3/21/2016, has been replaced with an amended version per counsel's request. Exhibit B has now been fully redacted. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA(nms)
June 16, 2016 Filing 527 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Callwave Communications, LLC's Amended First Collective Interrogatories to '970 Track Defendants (1-7) filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
June 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 526 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Plaintiffs objections to the Report and Recommendation Relative to the Parties Motions to Strike and other Discovery issues are OVERRULED, and the Court ADOPTS the Rulings and Recommendations Relative to the Parties Motions to Strike and other Discovery Issues. Plaintiffs motion to strike (D.I. 427; No. 12-1702, D.I. 446; No. 12-1704, D.I. 407; No. 13-711, D.I. 241) is DENIED. Defendants motion to strike (D.I. 448; No. 12-1702, D.I. 457; No. 12-1704, D.I. 407; No. 13-711, D.I. 252) is DENIED. The motion to expedite the briefing (D.I. 429, No. 12-1702, D.I. 447; No. 12-1704, D.I. 408; No. 13-711, D.I. 242) is DISMISSED as moot. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/16/2016. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:13-cv-00711-RGA(nms)
June 15, 2016 Filing 525 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from James G. McMillan, III regarding response to Court's Oral Order issued earlier today. (McMillan, James) Modified on 6/15/2016 (nms).
June 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 524 ORAL ORDER: CallWave is directed to send a letter to the Court today advising whether the depositions of Dr. Elderling and Mr. Hoffpauir have occurred, or are scheduled, and, if so, when. Further, if they have occurred, and were after December 17, 2015, were they questioned about "Shared Call Appearance"?. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/15/2016. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:13-cv-00711-RGA(nms)
June 13, 2016 Filing 523 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Christopher Boundy as co-counsel. Reason for request: no longer with firm. (McMillan, James)
June 7, 2016 Filing 522 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Edward A. Pennington, Esquire, Sid V. Pandit, Esquire, Stephanie D. Scruggs, Esquire, Sean T.C. Phelan, Esquire, and John P. Pennington, Esquire as co-counsel.. (Schladweiler, Benjamin)
June 7, 2016 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Kevin J. Patariu, John P. Schnurer for Verizon Services Corp. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (klc)
June 6, 2016 Filing 521 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John Schnurer and Kevin J. Patariu - filed by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Services Corp.. (Schladweiler, Benjamin)
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 521 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John Schnurer and Kevin J. Patariu filed by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Services Corp.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/6/2016. (nms)
May 19, 2016 Filing 520 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority In Support Of Callwave Communications, LLC's Brief In Opposition To Defendants' Renewed Motion For Judgment On The Pleadings That All Asserted Claims Of The '970 Patent Are Invalid Under § 101, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(McMillan, James) Modified on 5/19/2016 (nms).
April 29, 2016 Filing 519 NOTICE of Petition for Covered Business Method Review by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Petition)(Blumenfeld, Jack)
April 28, 2016 Filing 518 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority In Support Of Brief In Opposition To Defendants' Renewed Motion For Judgment On The Pleadings That All Asserted Claims Of The '970 Patent Are Invalid Under § 101, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibits E-G)(McMillan, James) Modified on 4/28/2016 (nms). Modified on 4/29/2016 (nms).
April 13, 2016 Filing 517 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Callwave Communications, LLC's Supplemental Objections and Responses to Defendants' Collective Requests for Admission (Requests for Admissions 6, 8-12, 18, 20, 27, 29) to Plaintiff Relating to the '970 Track, filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
April 4, 2016 Filing 516 REDACTED VERSION of 513 MOTION to Seal Confidential Portions of the Transcript of the Hearing Before Special Master Saville on February 24, 2016, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-D)(McMillan, James) Modified on 4/4/2016 (nms).
April 1, 2016 Filing 515 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Callwave Communications, LLC's Third Supplemental Responses and Objections to Google's First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff Relating to the '970 Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
March 30, 2016 Filing 514 7.1.1 Certification by CallWave Communications LLC re MOTION to Seal.(McMillan, James) Modified on 3/31/2016 (nms).
March 28, 2016 Filing 513 [SEALED] MOTION to Seal Confidential Portions of the Transcript of the Hearing Before Special Master Saville on February 24, 2016- filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D)(McMillan, James) Modified on 3/29/2016 (nms).
March 25, 2016 Filing 512 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Verizon Services Corp. and Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless' Supplemental Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's Fifth Set of Interrogatories to Verizon for the '970 Track filed by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Services Corp..(Schladweiler, Benjamin)
March 24, 2016 Filing 511 Amended TRANSCRIPT REQUEST, by CallWave Communications LLC - A Transcript is Already on File. (McMillan, James) Modified on 3/29/2016 (nms).
March 21, 2016 Filing 510 REDACTED VERSION of 507 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Transcript, by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-D, # 2 Proposed Order)(Saindon, Paul) Modified on 3/21/2016 (nms).
March 19, 2016 Filing 509 Official Transcript of Section 101 Motion held on 03-16-16 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leonard A. Dibbs. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/11/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/19/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/17/2016. (lad)
March 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 508 ORDER granting (530) [SEALED] Unopposed MOTION to Seal Transcript in case 1:12-cv-01701-RGA; granting (515) Motion to Seal Document in case 1:12-cv-01702-RGA; granting (351) Motion to Seal Document in case 1:12-cv-01703-RGA; granting (507) Motion to Seal Document in case 1:12-cv-01704-RGA. Signed by Yvonne Saville, Special Master on 3/16/2016. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(ksr, )
March 15, 2016 CORRECTING ENTRY: A proposed order has been added to the Unopposed Motion to Seal Confidential Portions of the Transcript of the Hearing Before Special Master Saville on February 24, 2016, filed on March 14, 2016. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(nms)
March 14, 2016 Filing 507 [SEALED] Unopposed MOTION to Seal Transcript - filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-D)(Saindon, Paul) Modified on 3/15/2016 (nms). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/15/2016: # 5 Proposed Order) (nms).
March 14, 2016 Filing 506 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Amended Notice of Deposition to Brian Zhang Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30 will commence on March 15, 2016 filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
March 14, 2016 Filing 505 CORRECTED NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA for the Federal Circuit re 501 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit), filed by CallWave Communications LLC. USCA Case Number 16-1687. (nms)
March 14, 2016 Filing 504 NOTICE of Subsequent Authority (Peschke Map Technologies LLC v. Rouse Properties Inc.) by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Saindon, Paul)
March 11, 2016 Filing 503 NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA for the Federal Circuit re 501 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit), filed by CallWave Communications LLC. USCA Case Number 16-1687. (nms)
March 10, 2016 Filing 502 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by CallWave Communications LLC for proceedings held on February 9, 2016 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Transcript Not Needed. (McMillan, James) Modified on 3/10/2016 (nms).
March 10, 2016 Filing 501 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Federal Circuit of 481 Order, 483 Judgment, . Appeal filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James)
March 10, 2016 Notification regarding 501 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit) sent to Reporter Dibbs. (cna)
March 10, 2016 APPEAL - Credit Card Payment of $505.00 received re 501 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit) filed by CallWave Communications LLC. ( Filing fee $505, receipt number 0311-1892665.) (McMillan, James)
March 7, 2016 Filing 500 Official Transcript of Discovery Conference held on 2/24/2016 before Judge Special Master Yvonne T. Saville. Court Reporter/Transcriber Basye Santiago Reporting,Telephone number 302-573-2300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 3/28/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/7/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/6/2016. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA -RGA(ksr, ) Modified on 3/9/2016 (ksr, ).
March 7, 2016 Filing 499 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Fifth Supplemental Responses to Defendant' First Common Set of Interrogatories Relating to the '970 Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
March 3, 2016 Filing 498 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Second Supplemental Responses and Objections to Google's First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff Callwave Communications, LLC Relating to the '970 Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
March 2, 2016 Filing 497 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) Callwave Communications, LLC's Notice of Deposition to be taken of Brian Zhang on March 11, 2016 and 2) Callwave Communications, LLC's Amended Notice of Deposition to be taken of Defendants Verizon Services Corp. and Cellco Partnership, d/b/a Verizon Wireless on March 11, 2016 filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
March 2, 2016 Filing 496 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Response and Objections to Defendants' Notice of Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition to Plaintiff Callwave Communications, LLC Related to the '970 Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
March 1, 2016 Filing 495 REDACTED VERSION of 491 Letter, by Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul) Modified on 3/1/2016 (nms).
March 1, 2016 REDACTION NOTICE: In accordance with section G of the Administrative Procedures Governing Filing and Service by Electronic Means, redacted versions of sealed documents shall be filed electronically within 7 days of the filing of the sealed document. The records of this case do not reflect the filing of a redacted version of DI # 491 . (nms)
February 26, 2016 Filing 494 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Verizon Communications Inc. and Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless' First Supplemental Response to Interrogatory No. 1 to Verizon for the '970 Track filed by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Services Corp..(Schladweiler, Benjamin)
February 25, 2016 Filing 493 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Fifth Individual Interrogatories to Verizon Services Corp. and Cellco Partnership, d/b/a Verizon Wireless Relating to the '970 Track (6-9) filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
February 19, 2016 Filing 492 REDACTED VERSION of 485 MOTION to Redact Transcript of the Hearing Before Special Master Saville on January 8, 2016, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits C-D)(McMillan, James) Modified on 2/19/2016 (nms).
February 18, 2016 Filing 491 [SEALED] Letter to Special Master Saville from Paul Saindon regarding Discovery. (Saindon, Paul)
February 17, 2016 Filing 490 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Google Inc.'s Supplemental Responses and Objections to Callwave Communications, LLC's First Interrogatories to Google Regarding the '970 Track filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
February 17, 2016 Filing 489 Redaction version of 474 Transcript. (nms)
February 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 488 ORDER Granting (498 in 12-cv-1702-RGA, 485 in 12-cv-1704-RGA, 505 in 12-cv-1701-RGA) MOTION to Redact Transcript of the Hearing Before Special Master Saville on January 8, 2016. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/17/2016. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(nms)
February 17, 2016 Filing 487 7.1.1. Statement by CallWave Communications LLC re MOTION to Redact Transcript of the Hearing Before Special Master Saville on January 8, 2016. (McMillan, James) Modified on 2/17/2016 (nms).
February 16, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (504 in 12-cv-1701-RGA, 283 in 12-cv-1788-RGA, 484 in 12-cv-1704-RGA) Stipulation Amended Scheduling Order (see Stipulation for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/16/2016. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
February 12, 2016 Filing 486 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (i) Defendants Verizon Communications Inc. and Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless' Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Collective Set of Requests for Admission to Defendants for the '970 Track (1-10), (ii) Defendants Verizon Communications Inc. and Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless' Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's Fourth Set of Interrogatories to Verizon for the '970 Track, and (iii) Defendants Verizon Communications Inc. and Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless' Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Individual Set of Requests for Admission to Verizon Communications, Inc., Cellco Partnership, d/b/a Verizon Wireless for the '970 Track (1-21) filed by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Services Corp..(Schladweiler, Benjamin)
February 12, 2016 Filing 485 [SEALED] MOTION to Redact Transcript of the Hearing Before Special Master Saville on January 8, 2016 - filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D)(McMillan, James) Modified on 2/16/2016 (nms).
February 12, 2016 Filing 484 STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Amend Scheduling Order, by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James) Modified on 2/16/2016 (nms).
February 11, 2016 CORRECTING ENTRY: The transcript filed at D.I. 484 has been removed from the docket. Counsel has been instructed to contact Chambers. (nms)
February 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 483 FINAL JUDGMENT in favor of Defendants and against Callwave on the claims for infringement of claims 13-17 of the '933 Patent (see Judgment for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/9/2016. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms) Modified on 2/9/2016 (nms).
February 8, 2016 Filing 482 PROPOSED Final Judgment, by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James) Modified on 2/9/2016 (nms).
February 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 481 ORDER Granting (417 in 12-cv-1702-RGA, 373 in 12-cv-1704-RGA, 237 in 12-cv-1788-RGA, 308 in 12-cv-1703-RGA, 394 in 12-cv-1701-RGA) MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b). Plaintiff is DIRECTED to submit within five days a jointly agreed order to accomplish the above (see Order for details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/3/2016. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
February 1, 2016 Filing 480 NOTICE of SERVICE of Defendants Verizon Communications Inc. and Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless' Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's Third Set of Interrogatories to Verizon for the '970 Track by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Services Corp. (Schladweiler, Benjamin)
January 29, 2016 Filing 479 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Submit Joint Status Letter to one week after completion of summary judgment and Daubert motion briefing - filed by Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul)
January 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 478 ORAL ORDER: The Court will hear oral argument on the Renewed Motions for Judgment on the Pleadings that All Asserted Claims of the '970 Patent are Invalid under Section 101 (D.I. 439 in 12-cv-1701-RGA, D.I. 249 in 12-cv-1788-RGA, D.I. 419 in 12-cv-01704-RGA) on 3/16/2016, at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/29/2016. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
January 29, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (278 in 13-cv-711-RGA, 494 in 12-cv-1702-RGA, 479 in 12-cv-1704-RGA, 499 in 12-cv-1701-RGA) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Submit Joint Status Letter to one week after completion of summary judgment and Daubert motion briefing. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/29/2016. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:13-cv-00711-RGA(nms)
January 26, 2016 Filing 477 REDACTED VERSION of 473 Appendix, by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-S)(Saindon, Paul) Modified on 1/26/2016 (nms).
January 26, 2016 Filing 476 REDACTED VERSION of 472 Response to Objections, by Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul) Modified on 1/26/2016 (nms).
January 26, 2016 Filing 475 REQUEST for Oral Argument by CallWave Communications LLC re (263 in 13-cv-711-RGA, 469 in 12-cv-01702-RGA, 470 in 12-cv-1701-RGA, 448 in 12-cv-1704-RGA) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. (McMillan, James) Modified on 1/26/2016 (nms).
January 20, 2016 Filing 474 Official Transcript of Special Master Hearing held on 1/8/2016 before Special Master Saville. Court Reporter/Transcriber Wilcox & Fetzer,Telephone number 302-655-0477. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 2/10/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/22/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/19/2016. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(ksr, )
January 19, 2016 Filing 473 [SEALED] APPENDIX re Response to Objections, by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Part 2)(Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 1/20/2016 (nms).
January 19, 2016 Filing 472 [SEALED] Response To Objections, by Google Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 1/20/2016 (nms).
January 18, 2016 Filing 471 NOTICE of SERVICE of Defendants' Final Invalidity Contentions on the '970 Patent by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Services Corp. (Schladweiler, Benjamin)
January 13, 2016 Filing 470 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Plaintiffs First Collective Requests for Admission to All Defendants Relating to the 970 Track (1-10); (2) Plaintiffs First Individual Requests for Admission to Verizon Services Corp. and Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless Regarding the 970 Track (1-21); and (3) Plaintiffs Fourth Individual Interrogatories to Verizon Relating to the 970 Track (5) filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
January 12, 2016 Filing 469 REDACTED Version of 454 Sealed Appendix, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix)(McMillan, James) Modified on 1/12/2016 (nms).
January 12, 2016 Filing 468 REDACTED VERSION of 457 Letter, by Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul) Modified on 1/12/2016 (nms).
January 12, 2016 Filing 467 REDACTED VERSION of 456 Letter, by Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul) Modified on 1/12/2016 (nms).
January 12, 2016 CORRECTING ENTRY: D.I. 465 has been removed from the docket. Counsel shall refile the redacted filing which shall include a captioned cover page. (nms)
January 11, 2016 Filing 466 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Second Supplemental Disclosure of Infringement Contentions designated Restricted Confidential - Source Code against Verizon Services Corp. and Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
January 11, 2016 Filing 464 REDACTED VERSION of 452 Objections, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-B)(McMillan, James) Modified on 1/12/2016 (nms).
January 11, 2016 Filing 463 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Collective Reduced Set of Prior Art in the '970 Track filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
January 11, 2016 Filing 462 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Second Supplemental Invalidity Contentions on the '970 Patent filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
January 8, 2016 Filing 461 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Google's Second Supplemental Invalidity Contentions on the '970 Patent filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
January 8, 2016 Filing 460 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Collective and Google Inc.'s, Blackberry's and Verizon's Individual Requests for Admission to Plaintiff Callwave Communications, LLC Relating to the '970 Track filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
January 8, 2016 Filing 459 SUBPOENA Returned Executed as to Fitch, Even, Tabin & Flannery LLP (Duces Tecum) on December 15, 2015 (Schladweiler, Benjamin)
January 8, 2016 Filing 458 SUBPOENA Returned Executed as to Fitch, Even, Tabin & Flannery LLP on December 15, 2015 (Schladweiler, Benjamin)
January 7, 2016 Filing 457 [SEALED] Letter to Special Master Saville from Paul Saindon regarding Response to Callwave's 1/6/16 Letter. (Saindon, Paul)
January 6, 2016 Filing 456 [SEALED] Letter to Special Master Saville from Paul Saindon regarding Discovery. (Saindon, Paul)
January 5, 2016 Filing 455 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Third Individual Interrogatories to Defendants Verizon Services Corp. and Cellco Partnership, d/b/a Verizon Wireless, Relating to the '970 Track (4) filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
January 5, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (473 in 12-cv-1701-RGA, 472 in 12-cv-1702-RGA, 451 in 12-cv-1704-RGA, 267 in 13-cv-711-RGA) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties to submit a joint status letter to January 29, 2016, filed by Broadsoft Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/4/2016. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:13-cv-00711-RGA(nms)
January 4, 2016 Filing 454 [SEALED] APPENDIX B re 452 Objections, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 B Part 1, # 2 B Part 2, # 3 B Part 3, # 4 B Part 4, # 5 B Part 5, # 6 B Part 6, # 7 B Part 7, # 8 B Part 8, # 9 B Part 9, # 10 B Part 10, # 11 C Part 1, # 12 C Part 2, # 13 C Part 3, # 14 Certificate of Service)(McMillan, James) Modified on 1/5/2016 (nms).
January 4, 2016 Filing 453 APPENDIX A re 452 Objections, by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James) Modified on 1/5/2016 (nms).
January 4, 2016 Filing 452 [SEALED] OBJECTIONS by CallWave Communications LLC to 448 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Certificate of Service)(McMillan, James) Modified on 1/5/2016 (nms).
December 30, 2015 Filing 451 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties to submit a joint status letter to January 29, 2016 - filed by Google Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
December 29, 2015 Filing 450 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Second Supplemental Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
December 23, 2015 Filing 449 NOTICE of Withdrawal requesting Clerk to remove Edmond D. Johnson, formerly of Pepper Hamilton LLP as lead counsel. Reason for request: no longer with firm. by CallWave Communications LLC (McMillan, James)
December 17, 2015 Filing 448 RULINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master Yvonne Takvorian Saville. Please note that when filing Objections pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b)(2), briefing consists solely of the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages) and the Response to the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages). No further briefing shall be permitted with respect to objections without leave of the Court. Objections to R&R due by 1/4/2016. Signed by Yvonne Takvorian Saville on 12/10/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:13-cv-00711-RGA(ksr, )
December 11, 2015 Filing 447 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Fourth Supplemental Responses to Defendants' First Common Set of Interrogatories Relating to the '970 Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
December 10, 2015 Filing 446 NOTICE of Defendants' Notice of Subpoenas by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Services Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)(Schladweiler, Benjamin)
December 9, 2015 Filing 445 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Supplemental Disclosure of Infringement Contentions against Verizon Services Corp. and Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
December 8, 2015 Filing 444 REDACTED VERSION of 442 Reply Brief, by Broadsoft Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 36-48)(Mayo, Andrew) Modified on 12/8/2015 (nms).
December 4, 2015 Filing 443 Letter to the Honorable Ricahrd G. Andrews from Paul Saindon regarding Request for Oral Argument on Renewed Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings that All Asserted Claims of the '970 Patent are Invalid under Section 101. (Saindon, Paul) Modified on 12/4/2015 (nms).
December 4, 2015 CORRECTING ENTRY: The redaction notice filed on 12/4/2015, has been removed as it was entered in error. (nms)
December 1, 2015 Filing 442 [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re 427 Cross-MOTION to Strike Testimony of Dr. Lucantoni filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 36 - 48)(Blumenfeld, Jack)
November 30, 2015 Filing 441 REPLY BRIEF re 419 Renewed Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings that All Asserted Claims of the '970 Patent are Invalid Under Section 101 filed by Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul)
November 30, 2015 Filing 440 REDACTED VERSION of 436 Answering Brief in Opposition, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit K, # 3 Exhibit L)(McMillan, James) Modified on 12/1/2015 (nms).
November 30, 2015 Filing 439 NOTICE of SERVICE of Defendants Verizon Services Corp. and Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless's Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's Second Requests for Production to Verizon Related to the '970 Track (11) by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Services Corp. (Schladweiler, Benjamin)
November 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 438 SCHEDULING ORDER for the remainder of the '970 Track: Fact Discovery completed by 2/12/2016. Daubert and Dispositive Motions due by 5/27/2016 (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/24/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
November 23, 2015 Filing 437 EXHIBITS re 436 Reply Brief, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits B-E, # 2 Exhibits F-J, # 3 Certificate of Service)(McMillan, James) Modified on 11/24/2015 (nms).
November 23, 2015 Filing 436 [SEALED] Reply BRIEF re 407 MOTION to Strike Testimony of Dr. Eldering and Associated Document Productions, and In Opposition to 427 Cross Motion to Strike Testimony of Dr. Lucantoni, filed by CallWave Communications LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 12/3/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit K, # 3 Exhibit L, # 4 Certificate of Service)(McMillan, James) Modified on 11/24/2015 (nms). Modified on 11/24/2015 (nms).
November 20, 2015 Filing 435 PROPOSED Scheduling Order, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Letter)(McMillan, James) Modified on 11/24/2015 (nms).
November 20, 2015 Filing 434 NOTICE OF SERVICE of a subpoena on Sprint Spectrum L.P. and Sprint Communications Company L.P. filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(McMillan, James)
November 17, 2015 Filing 433 REDACTED VERSION of 428 Declaration of Stephen P. McBride, by Google Inc., Broadsoft Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-35)(Mayo, Andrew) Modified on 11/17/2015 (nms).
November 17, 2015 Filing 432 REDACTED VERSION of 427 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Google Inc., Broadsoft Inc.. (Mayo, Andrew) Modified on 11/17/2015 (nms).
November 17, 2015 REDACTION NOTICE: In accordance with section G of the Administrative Procedures Governing Filing and Service by Electronic Means, redacted versions of sealed documents shall be filed electronically within 7 days of the filing of the sealed document. The records of this case do not reflect the filing of redacted versions of DI # 427 and 428 . (nms)
November 16, 2015 Filing 431 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 419 Renewed Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings that All Asserted Claims of the '970 Patent are Invalid Under Section 101 filed by CallWave Communications LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 11/27/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7)(McMillan, James)
November 6, 2015 Filing 430 MULTI MEDIA DOCUMENT (Exhibit to the Memorandum in Opposition to the Motion to Strike), filed by Google Inc., and Broadsoft Inc. in the form of a CD-ROM. Filing related to (450 in 12-cv-1701-RGA, 459 in 12-cv-01702-RGA, 429 in 12-cv-1704-RGA, 254 in 13-cv-711-RGA) Notice of Filing Multi Media Materials. (Media on file in Clerk's Office). Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:13-cv-00711-RGA(nms)
November 6, 2015 CORRECTING ENTRY: The Sealed Notice of Multi-Media filing filed on 11/5/2015, has been unsealed. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:13-cv-00711-RGA(nms)
November 5, 2015 Filing 429 NOTICE of filing the following Non-Paper material(s) in multi media format: DVD. Original Non-paper material(s) to be filed with the Clerk's Office. Notice filed by John G. Day on behalf of Broadsoft Inc. (Day, John) Modified on 11/6/2015 (nms).
November 5, 2015 Filing 428 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Stephen P. McBride re 427 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Broadsoft Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibits 3-10, # 4 Exhibits 11-20, # 5 Exhibits 21, 22, 23, 25, 26, 27, 28, 29, 30, # 6 Exhibits 31-35)(Day, John) Modified on 11/6/2015 (nms).
November 5, 2015 Filing 427 [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 407 Motion to Strike Testimony of Dr. Eldering and Associated Document Productions, filed by Google Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 11/16/2015. (Day, John) Modified on 11/6/2015 (nms).
November 5, 2015 Filing 426 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoena on TracBeam, LLC filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(McMillan, James)
November 4, 2015 Filing 425 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff''s Supplemental Identification of Accused Products and Asserted Claims against Verizon Communications, Inc., and Cellco Partnership d/b/a/ Verizon Wireless filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
October 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 424 ORDER Regarding Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions due date (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/30/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:13-cv-00711-RGA(nms)
October 30, 2015 Filing 423 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoena on Sprint Nextel Corp. filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(McMillan, James)
October 30, 2015 Filing 422 Official Transcript of Scheduling Conference held on 10-29-15 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leonard A. Dibbs. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/20/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/30/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/28/2016. (lad)
October 30, 2015 Filing 421 PROPOSED ORDER regarding Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions, by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Letter)(Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 10/30/2015 (nms).
October 30, 2015 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Christopher J. Gaspar for Google Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(dmp, )
October 30, 2015 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Philip T. Chen for Google Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(dmp, )
October 30, 2015 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Mark C. Scarsi for Google Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(dmp, )
October 30, 2015 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Dat Nguyen for Google Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(dmp, )
October 30, 2015 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Ashlee Lin for Google Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(dmp, )
October 30, 2015 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Nathaniel T. Browand for Google Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(dmp, )
October 28, 2015 Set Answering Brief Deadline re 418 MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order. Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 11/16/2015. (nms)
October 28, 2015 Filing 420 OPENING BRIEF in Support re 419 Renewed Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings that All Asserted Claims of the '970 Patent are Invalid Under Section 101, filed by Google Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 11/16/2015. (Saindon, Paul) Modified on 10/28/2015 (nms).
October 28, 2015 Filing 419 Renewed Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings that All Asserted Claims of the '970 Patent are Invalid Under Section 101 - filed by Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul) Modified on 10/28/2015 (nms).
October 28, 2015 Filing 418 MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order - filed by Broadsoft Inc.. (Day, John) Modified on 10/28/2015 (nms).
October 27, 2015 Filing 417 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Second Requests for Production to Verizon Communications, Inc. and Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless Related to the '970 Track (11) filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
October 27, 2015 Filing 416 PROPOSED Scheduling Order re '970 Track, by Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul) Modified on 10/27/2015 (nms).
October 27, 2015 Filing 415 PROPOSED Scheduling Order, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Johnson, Edmond) Modified on 10/27/2015 (nms).
October 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 414 ORDER: Referring the motion to strike and motion to expedite to the Special Master. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/23/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:13-cv-00711-RGA(nms)
October 23, 2015 Filing 413 REDACTED VERSION of 409 Opening Brief in Support, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-B, # 2 Exhibits D-J, # 3 Exhibits K-T, # 4 Exhibits U-Z, # 5 Exhibits AA-JJ)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/23/2015 (nms).
October 23, 2015 Filing 412 REDACTED VERSION of 407 MOTION To Strike Testimony of Dr. Eldering and Associated Document Productions, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 7.1.1 Statement)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/23/2015 (nms).
October 22, 2015 Filing 411 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding opposition to Callwave's Motion to Shorten the Briefing Schedule. (Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 10/23/2015 (nms).
October 20, 2015 Filing 410 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Motion to Strike Testimony of Dr. Eldering and Associated Document Productions and Memorandum in Support thereof, together with Exhibits A through JJ filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
October 16, 2015 Filing 409 [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re 407 Motion To Strike Testimony of Dr. Eldering and Associated Document Productions, filed by CallWave Communications LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 11/2/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit D, # 4 Exhibit E, # 5 Exhibit F, # 6 Exhibit G, # 7 Exhibit H, # 8 Exhibit I, # 9 Exhibit J, # 10 Exhibit K, # 11 Exhibit L, # 12 Exhibit M, # 13 Exhibit N, # 14 Exhibit O, # 15 Exhibit P, # 16 Exhibit Q, # 17 Exhibit R, # 18 Exhibit S, # 19 Exhibit T, # 20 Exhibit U, # 21 Exhibit V, # 22 Exhibit W, # 23 Exhibit X, # 24 Exhibit Y, # 25 Exhibit Z, # 26 Exhibit AA, # 27 Exhibit BB, # 28 Exhibit CC, # 29 Exhibit DD, # 30 Exhibit EE, # 31 Exhibit FF, # 32 Exhibit GG, # 33 Exhibit HH, # 34 Exhibit II, # 35 Exhibit JJ)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/19/2015 (nms).
October 16, 2015 Filing 408 MOTION to Expedite Briefing on Motion to Strike - filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 7.1.1 Statement)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/19/2015 (nms).
October 16, 2015 Filing 407 [SEALED] MOTION To Strike Testimony of Dr. Eldering and Associated Document Productions - filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 7.1.1 Statement)(McMillan, James) Modified on 10/19/2015 (nms).
October 15, 2015 Filing 406 Order Setting Rule 16(b) Conference: A Scheduling Conference is set for 10/29/2015, at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/15/2015. (nms)
October 13, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (405 in 12-cv-1704-RGA, 239 in 13-cv-711-RGA, 444 in 12-cv-1702-RGA, 425 in 12-cv-1701-RGA) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for expert discovery and dispositive motions to various dates from October 14, 2015 through and including December 7, 2015, filed by CallWave Communications LLC (Reset Deadlines: Daubert/Dispositive Motions due by 11/4/2015) (see Stipulation for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/13/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:13-cv-00711-RGA(nms)
October 9, 2015 Filing 405 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for expert discovery and dispositive motions to various dates from October 14, 2015 through and including December 7, 2015 - filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (Johnson, Edmond)
October 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 404 ORAL ORDER: The MOTION to Lift Stay of Proceedings on the '970 Patent (412 in 12-cv-1701-RGA, 239 in 12-cv-1788-RGA, 391 in 12-cv-1704-RGA) is GRANTED. The hearing scheduled for 10/9/2015, is CANCELED. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/7/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
October 7, 2015 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Sean T.C. Phelan, John P. Pennington for Verizon Services Corp. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (klc)
October 7, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 403 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Sean T.C. Phelan and John P. Pennington filed by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Services Corp.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/7/2015. (nms)
October 6, 2015 Filing 403 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Sean T.C. Phelan and John P. Pennington - filed by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Services Corp.. (Schladweiler, Benjamin)
October 6, 2015 Filing 402 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding oral argument on CallWave's Motion to Lift the Stay of Proceedings on the '970 Patent scheduled for Friday, October 9, 2015. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
October 5, 2015 Filing 401 Supplemental Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Alphabet Inc. for Google Inc. filed by Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul)
October 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 400 ORAL ORDER: The Court will hold a hearing on the Motions to Lift Stay of Proceedings on the '970 Patent (D.I. 412 in 12-cv-1701-RGA, 239 in 12-cv-1788-RGA, 391 in 12-cv-1704-RGA) on 10/9/2015, at 1:00 PM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/1/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
September 25, 2015 Filing 399 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Reply Expert Report of Dr. Eric Burger Regarding Invalidity of U.S. Patent Nos. 7,397,910, 7,555,110, 8,325,901 and 7,822,188 filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
September 24, 2015 Filing 398 REPLY to 391 Motion to Lift Stay, filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-B)(McMillan, James) Modified on 9/25/2015 (nms).
September 21, 2015 Filing 397 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's 1) Reply Expert Report of Dr. David Lucantoni Regarding Dr. Eric Burger's Rebuttal Expert Report Regarding Infringement of U.S. Patent Nos.7,397,910, 7,555,110, 7822,188 and 8,325,901, and 2) Reply Expert Report of Dr. Glenn Reinman Regarding Dr. Eric Burger's Rebuttal Expert Report Regarding Infringement of U.S. Patent Nos.7,397,910, 7,555,110, 7822,188 and 8,325,901 filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
September 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 396 ORDER from Special Master Yvonne Takvorian Saville. Signed by Yvonne Takvorian Saville on 9/10/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(ksr, )
September 15, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 395 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Mark C. Scarsi, Philip T. Chen, Ashlee Lin, Dat Nguyen, Christopher Gaspar and Nathaniel Browand of Milbank, Tweed, Hadley & Mccloy LLP, filed by Google Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/15/2015. (nms)
September 14, 2015 Filing 395 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Mark C. Scarsi, Philip T. Chen, Ashlee Lin, Dat Nguyen, Christopher Gaspar and Nathaniel Browand of Milbank, Tweed, Hadley & Mccloy LLP- filed by Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul) Modified on 9/15/2015 (nms).
September 14, 2015 Filing 394 RESPONSE to 391 MOTION to Lift Stay, filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 9/15/2015 (nms).
September 10, 2015 Filing 393 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Reply Expert Reports to September 18, 2015 - filed by Broadsoft Inc.. (Day, John) Modified on 9/10/2015 (nms).
September 10, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (414 in 12-cv-1701-RGA, 437 in 12-cv-1702-RGA, 393 in 12-cv-1704-RGA, 221 in 13-cv-711-RGA) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Reply Expert Reports to September 18, 2015, filed by Broadsoft Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/10/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:13-cv-00711-RGA(nms)
August 27, 2015 Set Answering Brief Deadline re (412 in 12-cv-1701-RGA, 239 in 12-cv-1788-RGA, 391 in 12-cv-1704-RGA) MOTION to Lift Stay of Proceedings on the '970 Patent. Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 9/14/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
August 27, 2015 Filing 392 PROPOSED ORDER regarding Motion To Lift the Stay of Proceedings on the '970 Patent, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Johnson, Edmond) Modified on 8/28/2015 (nms).
August 27, 2015 Filing 391 MOTION to Lift Stay of Proceedings on the '970 Patent - filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 7.1.1. Certification, # 2 Exhibits A and B)(Johnson, Edmond) Modified on 8/28/2015 (nms).
August 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 390 ORDER from Special Master Yvonne Takvorian Saville.. Signed by Yvonne Takvorian Saville on 8/17/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(ksr, )
August 11, 2015 Filing 389 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Expert Report of Dr. Eric Burger Regarding Noninfringement of U.S. Patent Nos. 7,397,910, 7,555,110, 8,325,901 and 7,822,188 and (2) Expert Report Regarding Damages Applicable to Google, Inc. filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
August 10, 2015 Filing 388 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) Callwave Communications, LLC's Rebuttal Expert Report of Dr. David Lucantoni Regarding Dr. Eric Burger's Opening Expert Report Regarding the Validity of U.S. Patent Nos. 7,397,910, 7,555,110, 7,822,188 and 8,325,910 submitted on behalf of Google Inc. and 2) Callwave Communications, LLC's Rebuttal Expert Report of Dr. David Lucantoni Regarding Opening Invalidity Expert Report of Dr. Charles A. Eldering submitted on behalf of Google Inc. filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
August 3, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (408 in 12-cv-1701-RGA, 209 in 13-cv-711-RGA, 433 in 12-cv-1702-RGA, 387 in 12-cv-1704-RGA) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Exchange Expert Reports and Complete Expert Depositions, filed by Google Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/3/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:13-cv-00711-RGA(nms)
July 31, 2015 Filing 387 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Exchange Expert Reports and Complete Expert Depositions to see Stipulation for details - filed by Google Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
July 31, 2015 Filing 386 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Callwave Communications, LLC's Third Supplemental Responses to Google Inc.'s First Individual Interrogatories Relating to the Call Processing Track (4) and Plaintiff's Supplemental Responses and Objections to Google Inc.'s First Individual Requests for Admission Relating to the Call Processing Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
July 9, 2015 Filing 385 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLCs Notice of Deposition to be taken of Alex Wiesen on July 9, 2015 filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
July 9, 2015 Filing 384 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's 1) Expert Report of Philip Green, 2) Expert Report of Dr. David Lucantoni, and 3) Expert Report of Dr. Glenn Reinman filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
July 7, 2015 Filing 383 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Thomas F. Fitzpatrick - filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Thomas F. Fitzpatrick)(Johnson, Edmond)
July 7, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 383 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Thomas F. Fitzpatrick filed by CallWave Communications LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/7/2015. (nms)
June 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 382 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master for (391 in 12-cv-1701-RGA, 307 in 12-cv-1703-RGA, 370 in 12-cv-1704-RGA, 414 in 12-cv-1702-RGA). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/29/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(nms)
June 26, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (381 in 12-cv-1704-RGA, 425 in 12-cv-1702-RGA, 402 in 12-cv-1701-RGA, 204 in 13-cv-711-RGA) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for expert reports to opening July 2, 2015; rebuttal August 3, 2015; and reply August 31, 2015, filed by Google Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/26/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:13-cv-00711-RGA(nms)
June 26, 2015 Filing 381 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for expert reports to opening - July 2, 2015; rebuttal - August 3, 2015; and reply - August 31, 2015 - filed by Google Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
June 22, 2015 Filing 380 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendant's Fifth Supplemental Invalidity Contentions and (2) Defendant Google Inc.'s Reduced Set of Prior Art in the Call Processing Track filed by Google Inc..(Blumenfeld, Jack)
June 22, 2015 Filing 379 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding entry of Rule 54(b) judgment. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
June 17, 2015 Filing 378 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Google Inc.'s Factual Disclosure filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
June 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 377 ORDER Regarding Claim Construction For Call Processing Patents (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/15/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:13-cv-00711-RGA(nms)
June 15, 2015 Filing 376 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Second Supplemental Responses to Google Inc.'s First Individual Interrogatories Relating to the Call Processing Track (5-7) filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
June 12, 2015 Filing 375 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) Callwave Communications, LLC's Amended Notice of Deposition to be taken of Margaret Johnson on June 19, 2015; and 2) Callwave Communications, LLC's Notice of Deposition to be taken of Defendant Google Inc. on June 19, 2015 filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
June 8, 2015 Filing 374 PROPOSED Order regarding Claim Construction for Call Processing Patents, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Johnson, Edmond) Modified on 6/9/2015 (nms).
June 4, 2015 Set Answering Brief Deadline re 373 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) . Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 6/22/2015. (nms)
June 4, 2015 Filing 373 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) - filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (Johnson, Edmond)
June 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 372 MEMORANDUM OPINION providing claim construction for the disputed terms found in U.S. Patent No., 7,397,910, 7,555,110, 7,636,428,7,822,188, 8,064,588, 8,325,901, and 8,351,591. Within five days the parties shall submit a proposed order consistent with this Memorandum Opinion suitable for submission to the jury. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/3/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:13-cv-00711-RGA(nms)
June 2, 2015 Filing 371 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Identification of the reduced list of Asserted Patents and Claims against Defendant Google Inc. filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
June 1, 2015 Filing 370 RULINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master Yvonne Takvorian Saville - Objections to R&R due by 6/25/2015. Signed by Yvonne Takvorian Saville, Special Master on 6/1/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(ksr, )
May 26, 2015 Filing 369 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Fourth Supplemental Responses to Defendants' First Common Interrogatories Relating to the Call Processing Track (7) filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
May 26, 2015 Filing 368 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Supplemental Responses to Google Inc.'s First Individual Interrogatories Relating to the Call Processing Track (5) filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
May 26, 2015 Filing 367 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Supplemental Disclosure of Infringement Contentions Against Google Inc. filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
May 22, 2015 Filing 366 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Fourth Supplemental Invalidity Contentions filed by Google Inc..(Blumenfeld, Jack)
May 22, 2015 Filing 365 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Notice of Deposition to be taken of Margaret Johnson on June 3, 2015 Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30 filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
May 20, 2015 Filing 364 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Google Inc.'s Supplemental Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
May 15, 2015 Filing 363 NOTICE of SERVICE of (i) Defendants Verizon Services Corp.'s Third Supplemental Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Common Interrogatories for the Call Processing Track, (ii) Verizon Services Corp.'s Second Supplemental Responses and Objections to CallWave's First Individual Interrogatories Relating to the Call Processing Track (1-4), and (iii) Verizon's Supplemental Responses and Objections to CallWave's Second Individual Interrogatories Relating to the Call Processing Track (5) by Verizon Services Corp. (Schladweiler, Benjamin)
May 15, 2015 Filing 362 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Notice of Deposition to be taken of Paul Peabody on May 19, 2015 filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
May 8, 2015 Filing 361 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Google Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Callwave Communications, LLC's Third Individual Interrogatories to Google Relating to the Call Processing Track (No. 6) filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
May 8, 2015 Filing 360 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Google Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Callwave Communications, LLC's First Individual Requests for Admission to Google Relating to the Call Processing Track (Nos. 1-22) and (2) Google Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Callwave Communications, LLC's First Collective Requests for Admission to All Defendants Relating to the Call Processing Track (Nos. 1-2) filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
May 8, 2015 Filing 359 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Notice of Deposition to be taken of Joseph Palmieri on May 12, 2015 filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
May 8, 2015 Filing 358 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's First Collective Requests for Admission Regarding the Call Processing Track (1-2); Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's First Individual Requests for Admission Regarding the Call Processing Track (1-20); Responses and Objections to Callwave's Second Individual Interrogatories Relating to the Call Processing Track (5); First Supplemental Responses and Objections to Callwave's First Individual Interrogatories Relating to the Call Processing Track (1-4); and Second Supplemental Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's First Set of Common Interrogatories for the Call Processing Track filed by Verizon Services Corp..(Schladweiler, Benjamin)
May 8, 2015 Filing 357 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Notice of Deposition to be taken of Robert Niessen on May 12, 2015 filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
May 6, 2015 Filing 356 NOTICE of SERVICE of Verizon Services Corp.'s Responses and Objections to CallWave's First Individual Interrogatories Relating to the Call Processing Track (1-4) by Verizon Services Corp. (Schladweiler, Benjamin)
May 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 354 SO ORDERED re (378 in 12-cv-1701-RGA, 353 in 12-cv-1704-RGA, 301 in 12-cv-1703-RGA, 399 in 12-cv-1702-RGA, 235 in 12-cv-1788-RGA) Stipulation and Proposed Order of Non-Infringement, filed by CallWave Communications LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/4/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
May 4, 2015 Filing 353 STIPULATION and Proposed Order of Non-Infringement, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Johnson, Edmond) Modified on 5/5/2015 (nms).
April 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 355 SO ORDERED re (351 in 12-cv-1704-RGA, 182 in 13-cv-711-RGA, 395 in 12-cv-1702-RGA, 376 in 12-cv-1701-RGA) Stipulation and Order extending deadlines in the Scheduling Order (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/30/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:13-cv-00711-RGA(nms)
April 30, 2015 Filing 352 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Google Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Callwave Communications, LLC's Second Individual Interrogatories to Google Relating to The Call Processing Track (Nos. 2-5) filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
April 30, 2015 Filing 351 STIPULATION to amend the scheduling order for call processing track actions by Broadsoft Inc.. (Mayo, Andrew)
April 28, 2015 Filing 350 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendants' Third Supplemental Invalidity Contentions and (2) Google Supplemental Privilege Log filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
April 27, 2015 Filing 349 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Notice of Deposition to Matt Reilly Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30 filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
April 21, 2015 Filing 348 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) Callwave Communications, LLC's Notice of Deposition to Paul Schneeloch Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30 and 2) Callwave Communications, LLC's Notice of Deposition to Lance Lockhart Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30 filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(Johnson, Edmond)
April 16, 2015 Filing 347 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Google Inc.'s First Supplemental Responses and Objections to Callwave Communications, LLC's First Interrogatories to Google Regarding the Call Processing Track (No. 1) filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
April 15, 2015 Filing 346 Redaction Version of 276 Transcript. (nms)
April 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 345 ORDER allowing redactions to the transcript for the hearing held on February 10, 2015 (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/15/2015. (nms)
April 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 344 ORDER Appointing Special Master: Yvonne Takvorian Saville appointed (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/14/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA et al.(nms)
April 14, 2015 Filing 343 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Google Inc.'s First Supplemental Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's First Collective Interrogatories to the Call Processing Track Defendants (Nos. 3 and 4) filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
April 14, 2015 Filing 342 PROPOSED Order regarding redactions to the Transcript of Motion to Stay, by AT & T Mobility LLC, Cellco Partnership, Verizon Services Corp.. (Schladweiler, Benjamin) Modified on 4/15/2015 (nms).
April 14, 2015 Filing 341 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Notice of Deposition to Mayur Kamat filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
April 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 340 ORDER REFERRING CASES to Clerk for assignment of a Special Master. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/13/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA et al.(nms)
April 8, 2015 Filing 339 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) Plaintiff's First Individual Requests for Admission to Google Inc. (1-22); and 2) Plaintiff's Third Individual Interrogatories to Google Inc. Relating to the Call Processing Track (6) filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
April 8, 2015 Filing 338 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's First Collective Requests for Admission to all Defendants Relating to the Call Processing Track (1-2) filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
April 8, 2015 Filing 337 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) Plaintiff's First Individual Requests for Admission to Verizon Services Corp., and Cellco Partnership, d/b/a Verizon Wireless Regarding the Call Processing Track (1-20); 2) Plaintiff's First Collective Requests for Admission to all Defendants Relating to the Call Processing Track (1-2); and 3) Plaintiff's Second Individual Interrogatories to Verizon Services Corp., and Cellco Partnership, d/b/a Verizon Wireless Verizon Relating to the Call Processing Track (5) filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
April 7, 2015 Filing 336 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's First Individual Interrogatories to Verizon Communications, Inc. and Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless Relating to the Call Processing Track (1-4) filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(Johnson, Edmond)
April 7, 2015 Filing 335 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Second Supplemental Invalidity Contentions filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
April 6, 2015 Filing 334 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Google Inc.'s First Individual Interrogatories to Plaintiff Callwave Communications, LLC relationg to the Call Processing Track (Nos. 1-9) and (2) Google Inc.'s First Individual Requests for Admission to Plaintiff filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
March 30, 2015 Filing 333 NOTICE of SERVICE of Defendant Verizon Services Corp.'s Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Requests for Production for the Call Processing Track by Verizon Services Corp. (Schladweiler, Benjamin)
March 30, 2015 Filing 332 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Google Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Callwave Communications, LLC's Fourth Requests for Production to Google Related to the Call Processing Track (Nos. 24-37) filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
March 30, 2015 Filing 331 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Second Individual Interrogatories to Google Inc. Relating to the Call Processing Track (2-5) filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
March 27, 2015 Filing 330 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Non-Party Callwave Telecom, Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Defendants' Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information, or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
March 27, 2015 Filing 329 NOTICE of Subpoenas by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 3/31/2015 (nms).
March 25, 2015 Filing 328 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Responses and Objections to Defendants' Notice of Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition to Callwave Communications, LLC Related to the Call Processing Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
March 25, 2015 Filing 327 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Callwave Communications, LLC's Notice of Deposition to James Maccoun Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30 filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
March 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 326 ORDER Granting 245 MOTION to Stay the Call Processing Track Pending Resolution of Supplier's Declaratory Judgment Action, filed by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Services Corp.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/25/2015. (nms)
March 20, 2015 Filing 325 REDACTED VERSION of 316 Letter, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit F, # 5 Certificate of Service)(Johnson, Edmond) Modified on 3/23/2015 (nms).
March 20, 2015 Filing 324 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Objections and Responses to Defendants' Notice of Deposition of Non-Party Richard Sanders filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
March 19, 2015 Filing 323 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Megan E. Lantto - filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James)
March 19, 2015 Filing 322 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Bryana T. McGillycuddy - filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James)
March 19, 2015 Filing 321 REDACTED VERSION of 313 Letter, by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 3/19/2015 (nms).
March 19, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (226 in 12-cv-1788-RGA, 287 in 12-cv-1703-RGA, 322 in 12-cv-1704-RGA, 341 in 12-cv-1702-RGA, 345 in 12-cv-1701-RGA, 165 in 13-cv-711-RGA) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Bryana T. McGillycuddy, filed by CallWave Communications LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/19/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA et al.(nms)
March 19, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (288 in 12-cv-1703-RGA, 323 in 12-cv-1704-RGA, 346 in 12-cv-1701-RGA, 166 in 13-cv-711-RGA, 227 in 12-cv-1788-RGA, 342 in 12-cv-1702-RGA) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Megan E. Lantto filed by CallWave Communications LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/19/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA et al.(nms)
March 18, 2015 Filing 320 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from John G. Day regarding proposed form of order on Verizon's Motion For Stay. (Attachments: # 1 Tab A, # 2 Tab B)(Day, John) Modified on 3/19/2015 (nms).
March 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 319 ORAL ORDER: The Motions for Judgment on the Pleadings of the '970 Patent (D.I. 257 and 281 in 12cv1701-RGA, 251 and 277 in 12cv1702-RGA, 213 and 237 in 12cv1703-RGA, and 234 and 262 in 12cv1704-RGA) are Dismissed with Leave To Renew upon the expiration of the Stay regarding the '970 Patent. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/18/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(nms)
March 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 318 MEMORANDUM ORDER Granting (228 in 12-cv-1701-RGA, 166 in 12-cv-1788-RGA, 207 in 12-cv-1704-RGA, 193 in 12-cv-1703-RGA, 223 in 12-cv-1702-RGA) Renewed Motion to Stay Proceedings on the '970 Patent Pending Inter Partes Review. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/18/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
March 13, 2015 Filing 317 EXHIBITS D and E to Letter dated 3/13/2014, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Johnson, Edmond) Modified on 3/13/2015 (nms).
March 13, 2015 Filing 316 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Edmond D. Johnson regarding Response to Karen Jacobs' Letter of March 11, 2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit F, # 5 Certificate of Service)(Johnson, Edmond)
March 13, 2015 Filing 315 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) Objections and Responses to Defendants' Notice of Deposition of Non-Party Mark Stubbs; 2) Non-Party Ritesh Bansal's Objections and Responses to Defendants' Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information or Objects, or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action; and 3) Non-Party Mark Stubb's Objections and Responses to Defendants' Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information or Objects, or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
March 12, 2015 Filing 314 Official Transcript of Motion to Stay held on 03-11-15 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leonard A. Dibbs. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/2/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/13/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/10/2015. (lad)
March 11, 2015 Filing 313 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Karen Jacobs regarding status report. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Jacobs, Karen) Modified on 3/11/2015 (nms).
March 11, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Andrews - Oral Argument held on 3/11/2015. (Court Reporter Leonard Dibbs.) Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:13-cv-00711-RGA(ksr, )
March 9, 2015 Filing 312 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) Non-Party James C. Otteson's Objections and Responses to Defendants' Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information or Objects, or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action; 2) Non-Party Michael Buday's Objections and Responses to Defendants' Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information or Objects, or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action; 3) Non-Party David Weiss's Objections and Responses to Defendants' Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information or Objects, or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action; 4) Objections and Responses to Defendants' Notice of Deposition of Non-Party David Weiss; 5) Non-Party Jeffrey Calvins's Objections and Responses to Defendants' Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information or Objects, or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action; 6) Objections and Responses to Defendants' Notice of Deposition of Non-Party Jeffrey Cavins; and 7) Non-Party David Giannini's Objections and Responses to Defendants' Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information or Objects, or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action. filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
March 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 311 ORAL ORDER: The Court will hear oral argument on the MOTION to Stay the Call Processing Track Pending Resolution of Supplier's Declaratory Judgment Action on 3/11/2015, at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/9/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:13-cv-00711-RGA(nms)
March 6, 2015 Filing 310 NOTICE of Subpoena to CallWave Telecom, Inc. by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 3/6/2015 (nms).
March 5, 2015 Filing 309 NOTICE of Subpoenas by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Services Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)(Schladweiler, Benjamin)
March 4, 2015 Filing 308 NOTICE of SERVICE of Defendant Verizon Services Corp.'s Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's Rule 30(b)(6) Notice of Deposition and Topics Related to the Call Processing Track by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Services Corp. (Schladweiler, Benjamin)
March 4, 2015 Filing 307 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Stephen J. Kraftschik, Esq. regarding AT&T, Sprint Spectrum, Sprint Communications, T-Mobile USA and Verizon Joinder to Google's Request for Oral Argument. (Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 3/4/2015 (nms).
March 3, 2015 Filing 306 NOTICE of Subpoena on Cisco Systems, Inc. by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Saindon, Paul)
March 3, 2015 Filing 305 REDACTED VERSION of 295 Letter, by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-C)(Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 3/4/2015 (nms).
March 2, 2015 Filing 304 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding Request for Oral Argument. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
March 2, 2015 Filing 303 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Edmond D. Johnson regarding response to Karen Jacobs' February 24, 2015 Letter. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-C, # 2 Exhibit D, # 3 Exhibit E)(McMillan, James) Modified on 3/3/2015 (nms).
February 27, 2015 Filing 302 REPLY BRIEF re 245 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings for Invalidation of the Asserted Claims of the '970 Patent, filed by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Services Corp.. (Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 3/3/2015 (nms).
February 27, 2015 Filing 301 REQUEST for Oral Argument by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Services Corp. re 245 MOTION to Stay the Call Processing Track Pending Resolution of Supplier's Declaratory Judgment Action. (Schladweiler, Benjamin)
February 26, 2015 Filing 300 NOTICE of Amended Subpoenas to Ritesh Bansal, Gerald Hosier, Robert Pedersen and Mark Stubbs by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-5)(Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 3/3/2015 (nms).
February 25, 2015 Filing 299 NOTICE of SERVICE of (i) Defendants Verizon Services Corp. and Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless's Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's Second Individual Interrogatories to Verizon Relating to the '970 Track (2-3), and (ii) Defendants Verizon Services Corp. and Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless's Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's First Individual Requests for Production to Verizon Related to the '970 Track (1-10) by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Services Corp. (Schladweiler, Benjamin)
February 25, 2015 Filing 298 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Fourth Requests for Production to Google Inc. Related to the Call Processing Track (24-37) filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
February 25, 2015 Filing 297 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's First Requests for Production to Verizon Services Corp. and Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless Related to the Call Processing Track (1-14) filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
February 24, 2015 Filing 296 NOTICE of Subpoena by Google Inc. (Saindon, Paul)
February 24, 2015 Filing 295 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Karen Jacobs regarding Status Report. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-C)(Jacobs, Karen)
February 24, 2015 Filing 294 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Responses and Objections to Google's First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff Callwave Communications, LLC Relating to the '970 Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
February 23, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (318 in 12-cv-01701-RGA, 267 in 12-cv-01703-RGA, 215 in 12-cv-01788-RGA, 293 in 12-cv-01704-RGA, 313 in 12-cv-01702-RGA) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME regarding Scheduling Order for the '970 Track to (see Stipulation), filed by Google Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/23/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
February 20, 2015 Filing 293 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME regarding Scheduling Order for the '970 Track to (see Stipulation) - filed by Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul)
February 20, 2015 Filing 292 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Google Inc.'s Responses and Objections to CallWave Communications, LLC's Third Requests for Production to Google Related to the Call Processing Track (20-23) filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
February 20, 2015 Filing 291 REPLY Brief in Further Support re 245 MOTION to Stay the Call Processing Track Pending Resolution of Supplier's Declaratory Judgment Action, filed by Verizon Services Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Schladweiler, Benjamin) Modified on 2/20/2015 (nms).
February 20, 2015 Filing 290 NOTICE of Subpoenas to Ritesh Bansal, Michael Buday, Jeffrey Cavins, David Giannini, Gerald Hosier, James Otteson, Robert Pedersen, Mark Stubbs and David Weiss, by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-12)(Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 2/23/2015 (nms).
February 20, 2015 CORRECTING ENTRY: The docket text for D.I. 291 has been corrected to reflect the filing is a Reply brief. Language regarding an answering brief date has also been removed. (nms)
February 17, 2015 Filing 289 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Richard Sanders on April 20, 2015 filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
February 17, 2015 Filing 288 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Callwave Communications, LLC on April 9, 2015 filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Saindon, Paul)
February 17, 2015 Filing 287 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Callwave Communications, LLC on April 9, 2015 filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Saindon, Paul)
February 17, 2015 Filing 286 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Richard Sanders on March 16, 2015 filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
February 17, 2015 Filing 285 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Callwave Communications, LLC on March 20, 2015 filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Saindon, Paul)
February 17, 2015 Filing 284 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Karen Jacobs regarding IPR Statistics. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-C)(Jacobs, Karen)
February 17, 2015 Filing 283 REDACTED VERSION of 275 Answering Brief in Opposition, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Johnson, Edmond) Modified on 2/18/2015 (nms).
February 17, 2015 Filing 282 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Edmond D. Johnson regarding Court's Request on February 10, 2015 re IPR Statistics. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Johnson, Edmond)
February 17, 2015 Filing 281 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 262 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings for Invalidation of the Asserted Claims of the '970 Patent filed by CallWave Communications LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 2/27/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Johnson, Edmond)
February 17, 2015 Filing 280 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Edmond D. Johnson, Esq. regarding Request for Oral Argument. (Johnson, Edmond) Modified on 2/18/2015 (nms).
February 17, 2015 Filing 279 REDACTED VERSION of 273 Letter, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-I)(Johnson, Edmond) Modified on 2/18/2015 (nms).
February 12, 2015 Filing 278 REPLY BRIEF re 234 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings for Invalidation of the Asserted Claims of the '970 Patent filed by Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul)
February 12, 2015 Filing 277 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Paul M. Kim as co-counsel. Reason for request: no longer with the law firm Wiley Rein LLP. (Schladweiler, Benjamin)
February 11, 2015 Filing 276 Official Transcript of Motion to Stay held on 02-10-15 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leonard A. Dibbs. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/4/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/16/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/12/2015. (lad)
February 10, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Andrews - Oral Argument held on 2/10/2015. (Court Reporter Leonard Dibbs.) Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(ksr, )
February 10, 2015 CORRECTING ENTRY: The pdf for D.I. 275 has been replaced per counsel's request. The date on the first page of the brief has been corrected. (nms)
February 9, 2015 Filing 275 [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 245 MOTION to Stay the Call Processing Track Pending Resolution of Supplier's Declaratory Judgment Action, filed by CallWave Communications LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 2/20/2015. (McMillan, James) (Main Document 275 replaced on 2/10/2015) (nms).
February 9, 2015 Filing 274 EXHIBIT J to 273 Letter, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Johnson, Edmond) Modified on 2/9/2015 (nms).
February 9, 2015 Filing 273 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Edmond D. Johnson regarding response to the Defendants' February 6, 2015 Letter regarding response to the Court's January 28, 2015 Oral Order. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibits D through I, # 5 Certificate of Service)(Johnson, Edmond)
February 6, 2015 Filing 272 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Karen Jacobs regarding response to the Courts January 28, 2015 Oral Order. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-C)(Jacobs, Karen)
February 6, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (245 in 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 271 in 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 291 in 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 286 in 1:12-cv-01702-RGA) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Anup K. Misra and Anthony DeMarco Pesce of WINSTON & STRAWN LLP filed by Google Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/6/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(nms)
February 5, 2015 Filing 271 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Anup K. Misra and Anthony DeMarco Pesce of WINSTON & STRAWN LLP - filed by Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul)
February 2, 2015 Filing 270 REDACTED VERSION of 255 Reply Brief, by AT & T Inc., AT & T Mobility LLC, Blackberry Corporation, Blackberry Limited, AT&T Inc., AT&T Mobility LLC, Google Inc., T-Moblie USA Inc., Cellco Partnership, Verizon Services Corp., Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 5-7)(Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 2/3/2015 (nms).
February 2, 2015 Filing 269 NOTICE of SERVICE of Defendants Verizon Services Corp. and Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless's Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's Second Collective Requests for Production to All '970 Track Defendants (27) by Verizon Services Corp. (Schladweiler, Benjamin)
February 2, 2015 Filing 268 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 234 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings for Invalidation of the Asserted Claims of the '970 Patent filed by CallWave Communications LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 2/12/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(McMillan, James)
February 2, 2015 Filing 267 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Google Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Callwave Communications, LLC's Second Collective Requests for Production to All Defendants Related to the Call Processing Track (No. 27) filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
February 2, 2015 Filing 266 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Googles Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Callwave Communications, LLC's Second Collective Requests for Production to All Defendants Related to the '970 Track (No. 27) filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
February 2, 2015 Filing 265 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Google Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Callwave Communications, LLC's Second Requests for Production to Google Inc. Related to the '970 Track (Nos. 17) filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
February 2, 2015 Filing 264 NOTICE of SERVICE of Defendant Verizon Services Corp.'s Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's Second Requests for Production for the Call Processing Track by Verizon Services Corp. (Schladweiler, Benjamin)
January 30, 2015 Filing 263 OPENING BRIEF in Support re 262 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings for Invalidation of the Asserted Claims of the '970 Patent filed by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Services Corp..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 2/17/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-B)(Kraftschik, Stephen)
January 30, 2015 Filing 262 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings for Invalidation of the Asserted Claims of the '970 Patent - filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, T-Moblie USA Inc., Verizon Services Corp., Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Kraftschik, Stephen)
January 28, 2015 Filing 261 Request for International Judicial Assistance, Pursuant to the Hague Convention on the Taking of Evidence Abroad in Civil or Commercial Matters, to Obtain Evidence From Locationet Systems Ltd.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/28/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
January 28, 2015 Filing 260 Request for International Judicial Assistance, Pursuant to the Hague Convention on the Taking of Evidence Abroad in Civil or Commercial Matters, to Obtain Evidence From MPD Technologies Ltd.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/28/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
January 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 259 ORAL ORDER: The Motion to Issue Letters of Request for International Judicial Assistance Pursuant to the Hague Evidence Convention is Granted (see D.I. 211 in 12-cv-01704-RGA, D.I. 196 in 12-cv-01703-RGA, D.I. 169 in 12-cv-01788-RGA, D.I. 232 in 12-cv-01701-RGA, D.I. 227 in 12-cv-01702-RGA). Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/28/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
January 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 258 ORAL ORDER: The Court will hear oral argument on the Renewed Motion to Stay Proceedings on the '970 Patent Pending Inter Partes Review by the Patent Trial and Appeal Board (see D.I. 228 in 12-cv-01701-RGA, D.I. 166 in 12-cv-01788-RGA, D.I. 207 in 12-cv-01704-RGA, D.I. 193 in 12-cv-01703-RGA, D.I. 223 in 12-cv-01702-RGA) on 2/10/2015, at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/28/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
January 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 257 ORAL ORDER: By no later than Feb. 6, 2015, all moving parties for the stay of the '970 track are requested to advise, if the stay were to be granted, whether the party would agree to be bound just as if it were the petitioner for the IPR, which, to the Court's understanding, would mean that the party could not raise any invalidity ground that was, or reasonably could have been, raised in the IPR, that is, section 102 & 103 arguments based on prior art consisting of patents or printed publications. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/28/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
January 27, 2015 Filing 256 Official Transcript of Discovery Dispute held on 01-23-15 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leonard A. Dibbs. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/17/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/27/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/27/2015. (lad)
January 26, 2015 Filing 255 [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re 211 MOTION to Issue Letters of Request for International Judicial Assistance Pursuant to the Hague Evidence Convention filed by Cellco Partnership, Google Inc., Verizon Services Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 5-7)(Kraftschik, Stephen)
January 26, 2015 Filing 254 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Google Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Callwave Communications, LLC's Second Requests for Production Related to the Call Processing Track (12-19) filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
January 23, 2015 Filing 253 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Plaintiff's Second Individual Interrogatories to Verizon Communications, Inc., and Cellco Partnership, d.b.a. Verizon Wireless Relating to the '970 Track (2-3) and 2) Plaintiff's First Individual Requests for Production to Verizon Communications, Inc., and Cellco Partnership, d.b.a. Verizon Wireless Related to the '970 Track (1-10) filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
January 23, 2015 Filing 252 REDACTED VERSION of 236 Answering Brief in Opposition, by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James) Modified on 1/26/2015 (nms).
January 23, 2015 Filing 251 REDACTED VERSION of 229 Exhibit A in support of Declaration, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(McMillan, James) Modified on 1/23/2015 (nms).
January 23, 2015 Filing 250 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Google Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff Callwave Communications, LLC Relating to the '970 Track filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
January 23, 2015 REDACTION NOTICE: In accordance with section G of the Administrative Procedures Governing Filing and Service by Electronic Means, redacted versions of sealed documents shall be filed electronically within 7 days of the filing of the sealed document. The records of this case do not reflect the filing of a redacted version of DI # 229 . (nms)
January 23, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Andrews - Discovery Conference held on 1/23/2015. (Court Reporter Leonard Dibbs.) Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(ksr, )
January 22, 2015 Filing 249 DECLARATION of Robert J. Scheffel re 246 MEMORANDUM in Support, by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Services Corp.. (Schladweiler, Benjamin) Modified on 1/22/2015 (nms).
January 22, 2015 Filing 248 DECLARATION of Gary Lance Lockhart re 246 MEMORANDUM in Support, by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Services Corp.. (Schladweiler, Benjamin) Modified on 1/22/2015 (nms).
January 22, 2015 Filing 247 DECLARATION of Paul Schneeloch re 246 MEMORANDUM in Support, by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Services Corp.. (Schladweiler, Benjamin) Modified on 1/22/2015 (nms).
January 22, 2015 Filing 246 MEMORANDUM in Support re 245 MOTION to Stay the Call Processing Track Pending Resolution of Supplier's Declaratory Judgment Action, filed by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Services Corp..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 2/9/2015. (Schladweiler, Benjamin) Modified on 1/22/2015 (nms).
January 22, 2015 Filing 245 MOTION to Stay the Call Processing Track Pending Resolution of Supplier's Declaratory Judgment Action - filed by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Services Corp.. (Schladweiler, Benjamin) Modified on 1/22/2015 (nms).
January 22, 2015 Filing 244 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Edmond D. Johnson regarding fact discovery deadline. (Attachments: # 1 Exhbits A and B)(Johnson, Edmond)
January 21, 2015 Filing 243 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Karen Jacobs regarding Defendants seek a modest two month extension of the February 25, 2015 fact discovery deadline. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Jacobs, Karen) (Main Document 243 replaced on 1/21/2015) (nms).
January 21, 2015 CORRECTING ENTRY: The main document pdf for the letter filed on 1/21/2015, has been swapped out with an amended version. The new version removes any reference to C.A. 13-711-RGA. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
January 20, 2015 Filing 242 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Google's Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's Rule 30(b)(6) Notice of Deposition and Topics Related to the '970 Track and (2) Google's Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's Rule 30(b)(6) Notice of Deposition and Topics Related to the Call Processing Track filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
January 20, 2015 Filing 241 REQUEST for Oral Argument by Blackberry Corporation, Blackberry Limited, AT&T Mobility LLC, T-Moblie USA Inc., Verizon Services Corp., Google Inc., Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P. regarding Renewed Motion to Stay Proceedings on the '970 Patent Pending Inter Partes Review by the Patent Trial and Appeal Board. (Dellinger, Megan) Modified on 1/21/2015 (nms).
January 20, 2015 Filing 240 DECLARATION re 239 Reply Brief, by AT & T Inc., AT & T Mobility LLC, Blackberry Corporation, Blackberry Limited, AT&T Mobility LLC, Google Inc., T-Moblie USA Inc., Cellco Partnership, Verizon Services Corp., Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits D & E)(Dellinger, Megan) Modified on 1/21/2015 (nms).
January 20, 2015 Filing 239 REPLY BRIEF re 207 Renewed Motion to Stay Proceedings on the '970 Patent Pending Inter Partes Review by the Patent Trial and Appeal Board, filed by Cellco Partnership, Google Inc., Verizon Services Corp.. (Dellinger, Megan) Modified on 1/21/2015 (nms).
January 20, 2015 Filing 238 REDACTED VERSION of 227 Sealed Answering Brief in Opposition, by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James) Modified on 1/20/2015 (nms).
January 16, 2015 Filing 237 EXHIBIT A re 236 Answering Brief in Opposition, by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James) Modified on 1/20/2015 (nms).
January 16, 2015 Filing 236 [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 211 MOTION to Issue Letters of Request for International Judicial Assistance Pursuant to the Hague Evidence Convention filed by CallWave Communications LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 1/26/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(McMillan, James)
January 16, 2015 Filing 235 OPENING BRIEF in Support re 234 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings for Invalidation of the Asserted Claims of the '970 Patent, filed by Google Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 2/2/2015. (Saindon, Paul) Modified on 1/16/2015 (nms).
January 16, 2015 Filing 234 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings for Invalidation of the Asserted Claims of the '970 Patent - filed by Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul) Modified on 1/16/2015 (nms).
January 15, 2015 Filing 233 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Third Requests for Production to Google Inc. Related to the Call Processing Track (20-23) filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
January 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ORAL ORDER: The parties have advised that a discovery dispute has arisen requiring judicial attention. The Court will hold a Discovery conference on 1/23/2015, at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews, to take up this issue. In preparation for this conference the parties shall follow the Discovery Matters and Disputes procedure as set forth in the Scheduling Order. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/14/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
January 14, 2015 Filing 231 Official Transcript of Markman Hearing held on 01-17-15 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leonard A. Dibbs. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/4/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/17/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/14/2015. (lad)
January 14, 2015 Filing 230 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Karen Jacobs regarding Construction of "switched network." (Jacobs, Karen) Modified on 1/15/2015 (nms).
January 13, 2015 Filing 229 [SEALED] EXHIBIT A re 228 Declaration, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(McMillan, James) Modified on 1/14/2015 (nms).
January 13, 2015 Filing 228 DECLARATION of Leah McCoy re 227 Answering Brief in Opposition, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B, # 2 Exhibit C)(McMillan, James) Modified on 1/14/2015 (nms).
January 13, 2015 Filing 227 [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 207 Renewed Motion to Stay Proceedings on the '970 Patent Pending Inter Partes Review by the Patent Trial and Appeal Board, filed by CallWave Communications LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 1/23/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(McMillan, James) Modified on 1/13/2015 (nms).
January 13, 2015 Filing 226 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Supplemental Invalidity Contentions filed by Broadsoft Inc..(Mayo, Andrew)
January 13, 2015 CORRECTING ENTRY: Exhibit A has been added to D.I. 224 . The exhibit was inadvertently omitted from the initial filing. (nms)
January 12, 2015 Filing 225 Letter to Judge Andrews from James G. McMillan, III regarding response to the Court's oral order of January 8 re: construction of "switched network". (McMillan, James)
January 12, 2015 Filing 224 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Karen Jacobs regarding response to the Court's oral order of January 8 (D.I. 242 ) re: construction of "switched network." (Jacobs, Karen) Modified on 1/13/2015 (nms). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/13/2015: # 3 Exhibit A) (nms).
January 12, 2015 Filing 223 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Karen Jacobs regarding response to CallWave's letter submitted on January 9, 2015 re: outcall. (Jacobs, Karen) Modified on 1/13/2015 (nms).
January 12, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (238 in 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 244 in 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 205 in 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 175 in 1:12-cv-01788-RGA, 221 in 1:12-cv-01704-RGA) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to file answering brief in opposition to Renewed Motion to Stay Proceedings on the '970 Patent to January 13, 2015, filed by CallWave Communications LLC (Reset Briefing Schedule: Answering Brief due 1/13/2015). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/12/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
January 9, 2015 Filing 222 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding Callwave's Modified Proposal. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
January 9, 2015 Filing 221 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Callwave to file its answering brief in opposition to Defendants' Renewed Motion to Stay Proceedings on the '970 Patent to January 13, 2015 - filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (Johnson, Edmond)
January 9, 2015 Filing 220 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Edmond D. Johnson regarding Callwave's response to a request for citations made during the claim construction hearing on January 7, 2015. (Johnson, Edmond)
January 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORAL ORDER: The parties are ordered to submit letters to the Court by the close of business on Monday, January 12, 2015, explaining: (1) whether the switched network in claims 10 and 16 of the 428 patent should have an antecedent basis, and if so, what that antecedent basis is; and (2) how the term switched network in claims 10 and 16 of the 428 patent is different from the term network used in the same claims. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/8/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:13-cv-00711-RGA(nms)
January 7, 2015 Filing 218 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Notice of Deposition to Defendants Verizon Services Corp., Cellco Partnership, d/b/a Verizon Wireless Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) for the Call Processing Track and the "970 Track will be taken on January 28, 2015 filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
January 7, 2015 Filing 217 NOTICE of Subpoenas by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-7)(Kraftschik, Stephen)
January 6, 2015 Filing 216 NOTICE of Subpoena upon Ericsson, Inc. by AT&T Mobility LLC(Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Schladweiler, Benjamin) Modified on 1/7/2015 (nms).
January 6, 2015 Filing 215 REDACTED VERSION of 211 MOTION to Issue Letters of Request for International Judicial Assistance Pursuant to the Hague Evidence Convention, by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-4)(Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 1/6/2015 (nms).
January 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORAL ORDER: Due to a scheduling conflict the Markman Hearing set for 1/7/2015, will now commence at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/6/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA et al.(nms)
January 5, 2015 Filing 213 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Notice of Deposition to Defendant Google Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) for the Call Processing Track on January 21, 2015 filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
January 5, 2015 Filing 212 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Notice of Deposition to Defendant Google Inc. for the '970 Track on January 22, 2015 filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
December 30, 2014 Set Answering Brief Deadline re (211 in 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 196 in 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 169 in 1:12-cv-01788-RGA, 232 in 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 227 in 1:12-cv-01702-RGA) MOTION to Issue Letters of Request for International Judicial Assistance Pursuant to the Hague Evidence Convention. Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 1/16/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
December 30, 2014 Filing 211 [SEALED] MOTION to Issue Letters of Request for International Judicial Assistance Pursuant to the Hague Evidence Convention - filed by AT & T Mobility LLC, Blackberry Corporation, Blackberry Limited, Google Inc., T-Moblie USA Inc., Cellco Partnership, Verizon Services Corp., Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-4)(Kraftschik, Stephen)
December 24, 2014 Filing 210 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Second Requests for Production to Google Inc. Related to the Call Processing Track (12-19) filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
December 23, 2014 Filing 209 DECLARATION of Stephen J. Kraftschik re 207 Renewed Motion to Stay Proceedings on the '970 Patent Pending Inter Partes Review by the Patent Trial and Appeal Board, by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-C)(Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 1/4/2015 (nms).
December 23, 2014 Filing 208 OPENING BRIEF in Support re 207 Renewed Motion to Stay Proceedings on the '970 Patent Pending Inter Partes Review by the Patent Trial and Appeal Board, filed by Cellco Partnership, Google Inc., Verizon Services Corp..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 1/9/2015. (Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 1/4/2015 (nms).
December 23, 2014 Filing 207 Renewed Motion to Stay Proceedings on the '970 Patent Pending Inter Partes Review by the Patent Trial and Appeal Board - filed by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 1/4/2015 (nms).
December 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER Regarding Claim Construction For US Patents 6,771,970 and 7,907,933. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/23/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
December 22, 2014 Filing 205 PROPOSED Claim Construction Order, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A, # 2 Appendix B)(Johnson, Edmond) Modified on 12/23/2014 (nms).
December 22, 2014 Filing 204 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Google's Responses to Plaintiff's Second Interrogatories to Google Relating to the '970 Track (Nos. 2-5) and (2) Google's Responses and Objections to Callwave Communications, LLC's First Requests for Production Related to the '970 Track (Nos. 1-16) filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
December 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 203 MEMORANDUM OPINION providing claim construction for the disputed terms. Within five days the parties shall submit a proposed order consistent with this Memorandum Opinion suitable for submission to the jury. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/17/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
December 15, 2014 Filing 202 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Google's Responses to Plaintiff's Second Collective Interrogatories to the Call Processing Track Defendants (No. 8) filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
December 15, 2014 Filing 201 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Google's Responses to Plaintiff's Second Collective Interrogatories to the '933 Track Defendants (No. 8) and (2) Google's Responses to Plaintiff's Second Collective Interrogatories to the '970 Track Defendants (No. 8) filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
December 15, 2014 Filing 200 NOTICE of SERVICE of (i) Verizon's Objections to Callwave's Second Collective Interrogatories to the Call Processing Track Defendants (8), (ii) Defendants Verizon Services Corp. and Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless's Objections to Plaintiff's Second Set of Collective Interrogatories for the '970 Track, and (iii) Defendants Verizon Services Corp. and Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless's Objections to Plaintiff's Second Set of Collective Interrogatories for the '933 Track by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Services Corp. (Schladweiler, Benjamin)
December 12, 2014 Filing 199 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove James F. Hurst as co-counsel.. (Saindon, Paul)
December 10, 2014 Filing 198 Joint APPENDIX re 197 Joint Claim Construction Brief, by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-2, # 2 Exhibits 3-4, # 3 Exhibits 5-7)(Saindon, Paul) Modified on 12/11/2014 (nms).
December 10, 2014 Filing 197 Joint Claim Construction Brief (Call Processing), filed by Cellco Partnership, Google Inc., Verizon Services Corp.. (Saindon, Paul) Modified on 12/11/2014 (nms).
December 5, 2014 Pro Hac Vice Attorney LeinWeih A. Tseng for CallWave Communications LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA et al.(dmp, )
December 3, 2014 Filing 196 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Sur-Reply Claim Construction Brief Relating to the Call Processing Patents filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
December 3, 2014 Filing 195 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney L. Andrew Tseng - filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James)
December 3, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (210 in 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 195 in 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 214 in 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 184 in 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 158 in 1:12-cv-01788-RGA, 115 in 1:13-cv-00711-RGA) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney L. Andrew Tseng filed by CallWave Communications LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/3/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA et al.(nms)
November 24, 2014 Filing 194 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Third Supplemental Responses to Defendants' First Common Interrogatories Relating to the Call Processing Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
November 24, 2014 Filing 193 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Third Supplemental Responses to Defendants' First Set of Common Interrogatories Relating to the '970 Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
November 24, 2014 Filing 192 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Fourth Supplemental Responses to Defendants' First Set of Common Interrogatories Relating to the '933 Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
November 17, 2014 Filing 191 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Responsive Claim Construction Brief Relating to the Call Processing Patents filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
November 17, 2014 Filing 190 Official Transcript of Teleconference held on 11-14-14 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter/Transcriber Taneha Carroll. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/8/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/18/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/16/2015. (lad)
November 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORAL ORDER: The Court will hold a Telephone Conference today, 11/14/2014, at 3:00 PM before Judge Richard G. Andrews to take up the issues raised in the letters filed at D.I. 190 in 12-cv-1702-RGA, D.I. 169 in 12-cv-1703-RGA, D.I. 179 in 12-cv-1704-RGA, D.I.192 in 12-cv-1701-RGA, D.I. 170 in 12-cv-1703-RGA, D.I. 192 in 12-cv-1702-RGA, D.I. 194 in 12-cv-1701-RGA. The parties shall mutually coordinate the call to the Court. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/14/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(nms)
November 12, 2014 Filing 188 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Second Collective Interrogatories to Call Processing Track Defendants (8) filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
November 12, 2014 Filing 187 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Second Collective Interrogatories to '970 Track Defendants (8) filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
November 12, 2014 Filing 186 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Second Collective Interrogatories to '933 Track Defendants (8) filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
November 10, 2014 Filing 185 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Third Supplemental Responses to Defendants' First Set of Common Interrogatories Relating to the '933 Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
November 10, 2014 Filing 184 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Second Supplemental Responses to Defendants' First Set of Common Interrogatories Relating to the '970 Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
November 10, 2014 Filing 183 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Second Supplemental Responses to Defendants' First Set of Common Interrogatories Relating to the Call Processing Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
November 6, 2014 Filing 182 Official Transcript of Discovery Dispute held on 10-30-14 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leonard A. Dibbs. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/4/2015. (lad)
November 6, 2014 Filing 181 Official Transcript of Markman Hearing held on 10-29-14 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leonard A. Dibbs. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/4/2015. (lad)
November 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER Granting in part and Denying in Part (D.I. 108 in 12-cv-01702-RGA, D.I. 107 in 12-cv-01701-RGA, D.I. 101 in 12-cv-01704-RGA) MOTION to Amend Complaint (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/5/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(nms)
November 4, 2014 Filing 179 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from James G. McMillan, III regarding request for an exception to the agreed protective order. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(McMillan, James)
October 30, 2014 Filing 178 REDACTED VERSION of 170 Appendix, by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 10/31/2014 (nms).
October 30, 2014 Filing 177 REDACTED VERSION of 169 Letter, by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 10/31/2014 (nms).
October 30, 2014 Filing 176 REDACTED VERSION of 175 Letter, by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 10/31/2014 (nms).
October 30, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Andrews - Discovery Conference held on 10/30/2014. (Court Reporter Leonard Dibbs.) Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA et al.(ksr, )
October 29, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Andrews - Markman Hearing held on 10/29/2014. (Court Reporter Leonard Dibbs.) Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA et al.(ksr, )
October 29, 2014 Filing 175 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Karen Jacobs regarding response to CallWave's opening discovery dispute letter. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A & B)(Jacobs, Karen)
October 29, 2014 Filing 174 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Paul Saindon regarding response to CallWave's motion to compel. (Saindon, Paul)
October 29, 2014 Filing 173 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Edmond D. Johnson regarding Discovery Dispute. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Johnson, Edmond)
October 29, 2014 Filing 172 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Edmond D. Johnson regarding Discovery Dispute. (Johnson, Edmond)
October 28, 2014 Filing 171 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Edmond D. Johnson regarding Discovery Dispute. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Johnson, Edmond)
October 28, 2014 Filing 170 [SEALED] APPENDIX re (103 in 1:13-cv-00711-RGA, 179 in 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 142 in 1:12-cv-01788-RGA, 181 in 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 159 in 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 169 in 1:12-cv-01704-RGA) Letter by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-18)(Jacobs, Karen)
October 28, 2014 Filing 169 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Karen Jacobs regarding discovery dispute. (Jacobs, Karen)
October 28, 2014 Filing 168 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Paul Saindon regarding discovery dispute. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - 2)(Saindon, Paul)
October 28, 2014 Filing 167 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Edmond D. Johnson regarding Discovery Disputes. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Johnson, Edmond) Modified on 10/28/2014 (nms).
October 27, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (178 in 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 166 in 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 156 in 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 176 in 1:12-cv-01702-RGA) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney George C. Lombardi filed by Google Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/27/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(nms)
October 24, 2014 Filing 166 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney George C. Lombardi - filed by Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul)
October 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORAL ORDER: The discovery conference set by the Oral Order entered on 10/14/2014, (see 169 in 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 169 in 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 135 in 1:12-cv-01788-RGA, 135 in 1:12-cv-01788-RGA, 157 in 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 157 in 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 97 in 1:13-cv-00711-RGA, 97 in 1:13-cv-00711-RGA) will now commence at 8:30 a.m. in Courtroom 6A. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/24/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA et al.(nms)
October 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORAL ORDER: The parties have advised that the Google Defendant has a discovery dispute requiring judicial attention. The Court will hold a Discovery conference on 10/30/2014, at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews, to take up this issue. In preparation for this conference the parties shall follow the Discovery Matters and Disputes procedure as set forth in the Scheduling Order. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/24/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(nms)
October 24, 2014 Filing 163 Joint Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Paul Saindon on behalf of the parties regarding revised set of joint claim construction charts. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Saindon, Paul) Modified on 10/24/2014 (nms).
October 23, 2014 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Charles F. Koch for CallWave Communications LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00711-RGA et al.(els)
October 21, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (172 in 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 162 in 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 152 in 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 174 in 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 138 in 1:12-cv-01788-RGA) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Charles F. Koch filed by CallWave Communications LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/21/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
October 20, 2014 Filing 162 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Charles F. Koch - filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (Johnson, Edmond)
October 17, 2014 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Edward A. Pennington for Verizon Services Corp. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (els)
October 16, 2014 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Sid Pandit,Stephanie D. Scruggs for Verizon Services Corp. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (dmp, )
October 15, 2014 Filing 161 NOTICE of SERVICE of Defendants Verizon Services Corp. and Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless's Supplemental Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Services Corp. (Schladweiler, Benjamin)
October 15, 2014 Filing 160 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Sid Pandit, Stephanie D. Scruggs and Edward A. Pennington - filed by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Services Corp.. (Schladweiler, Benjamin)
October 15, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 160 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Sid Pandit, Stephanie D. Scruggs and Edward A. Pennington filed by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Services Corp.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/15/2014. (nms)
October 14, 2014 Filing 159 Joint Appendeix of CLAIM Construction Charts, by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Tabs A-L,Part1, # 2 Tabs A-L,Part2, # 3 Tabs A-L,Part3)(Saindon, Paul) Modified on 10/15/2014 (nms).
October 14, 2014 Filing 158 APPENDIX re (D.I. 168 in 12-cv-01702-RGA, D.I. 134 in 12-cv-01788-RGA, D.I. 156 in 12-cv-01704-RGA, D.I. 168 in 12-cv-01701-RGA, D.I. 147 in 12-cv-01703-RGA) Joint Claim Construction Brief, by AT & T Mobility LLC, Blackberry Corporation, Blackberry Limited, AT&T Mobility LLC, Google Inc., T-Moblie USA Inc., Cellco Partnership, Verizon Services Corp., Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-5, Part1, # 2 Exhibits 1-5, Part2, # 3 Exhibits 6-7)(Saindon, Paul) Modified on 10/15/2014 (nms).
October 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORAL ORDER: The parties have advised that a discovery dispute has arisen requiring judicial attention. The Court will hold a Discovery conference on 10/30/2014, at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews, to take up this issue. In preparation for this conference the parties shall follow the Discovery Matters and Disputes procedure as set forth in the Scheduling Order. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/14/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA, 1:13-cv-00711-RGA(ksr, )
October 14, 2014 CORRECTING ENTRY: The exhibits and two declarations attached to the Joint Claim Construction Brief filed on 10/9/2014, have been removed from that filing. Counsel shall refile these documents in a Joint Appendix and link it back to the Joint Brief it is in support of. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
October 9, 2014 Filing 156 Joint Claim Construction Brief, filed by Cellco Partnership, Google Inc., Verizon Services Corp.. (Saindon, Paul) Modified on 10/14/2014 (nms).
October 8, 2014 Filing 155 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Callwave Communications, LLC's Initial Proposed Claim Constructions for the Call Processing Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
October 7, 2014 Filing 154 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Initial Proposed Claim Constructions for the Call Processing Track filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
October 6, 2014 Filing 153 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Verizon Communications Inc. and Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless's First Supplemental Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Common Interrogatories for the '970 Track; (2) Defendants Verizon Communications Inc. and Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless's First Supplemental Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Common Interrogatories for the Call Processing Track; and (3) Defendants Verizon Communications Inc. and Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless's First Supplemental Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Common Interrogatories for the '933 Track filed by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Services Corp..(Schladweiler, Benjamin)
October 6, 2014 Filing 152 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Peter Lambrianakos as co-counsel. Reason for request: no longer at Winston & Strawn LLP. (Saindon, Paul)
October 2, 2014 Filing 151 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Sur-Reply Claim Construction Brief Relating to the '933 and '970 Patents filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
September 30, 2014 Filing 150 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Supplemental Responses to Defendants' First Common Set of Interrogatories Relating to the '970 Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
September 30, 2014 Filing 149 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Second Supplemental Responses to Defendants' First Set of Common Interrogatories Relating to the '933 Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
September 18, 2014 Filing 148 Official Transcript of Motion to Stay held on 09-16-14 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leonard A. Dibbs. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/9/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/20/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/17/2014. (lad)
September 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORAL ORDER: The Motion to Stay Proceedings (D.I. 104 in No. 12-1701; D.I. 103 in No. 12-1702; D.I. 92 in No. 12-1703; D.I. 96 in No. 12-1704; and D.I. 86 in No. 12-1788) is DENIED for the reasons stated in open court. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/16/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(ksr, )
September 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORAL ORDER: Per the phone call from the parties advising that the discovery disputes have been resolved, the Court has removed the discovery conference set for today, 9/16/2014, has been from its calendar. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/16/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA, 1:13-cv-00711-RGA(nms)
September 16, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Andrews - Oral Argument held on 9/16/2014. (Court Reporter Leonard Dibbs.) Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(ksr, )
September 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORAL ORDER: The parties have advised that discovery disputes have arisen requiring judicial attention. The Court will hold a Discovery Hearing on 9/16/2014, at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews, to take up this issue. In preparation for this conference the parties shall follow the Discovery Matters and Disputes procedure as set forth in the Scheduling Order. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/10/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA et al.(nms)
September 9, 2014 Filing 144 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Preliminary List of Claim Terms that Require Construction for the Call Processing Track filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
September 9, 2014 Filing 143 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's List of Claim Terms For Which Constructions Will Be Proposed filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
September 5, 2014 Filing 142 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) Callwave Communications, LLC's Opening Claim Construction Brief; 2) Declaration of David Kotz, Ph.D.; and 3) Declaration of Jeffrey J. Evans, Ph.D. filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
September 4, 2014 Filing 141 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Responses to Defendants' Second Set of Common Interrogatories Relating to the Call Processing Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
September 4, 2014 Filing 140 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) Callwave Communications, LLC's Responses to Defendants' Second Set of Common Interrogatories Relating to the '933 Track; and 2) Callwave Communications, LLC's Responses to Defendants' Second Set of Common Interrogatories Relating to the '970 Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
August 27, 2014 Filing 139 NOTICE of Subpoena upon David Hofstatter by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Kraftschik, Stephen)
August 21, 2014 Filing 138 NOTICE of Subpoenas, by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-6)(Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 8/25/2014 (nms).
August 15, 2014 Filing 137 Joint APPENDIX, Vol. II of II re Claim Construction Chart, by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James) Modified on 8/15/2014 (nms).
August 15, 2014 Filing 136 Joint APPENDIX, Vol. I of II, re Claim Construction Chart, by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James) Modified on 8/15/2014 (nms).
August 15, 2014 CORRECTING ENTRY: The Joint Appendix entries filed on 8/15/2014, have been removed from the dockets. The filings were not formatted appropriately with proper cover pages providing the case caption and titles (Volumes I and II) for the filings. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
August 14, 2014 Filing 135 CLAIM Construction Chart for the '970 Track, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(McMillan, James) Modified on 8/15/2014 (nms).
August 14, 2014 Filing 134 CLAIM Construction Chart for '933 Track, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(McMillan, James) Modified on 8/15/2014 (nms).
August 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORAL ORDER: The Court will hear oral argument on the MOTION to Stay Proceedings on the '970 Patent Pending Inter Partes Review by the Patent Trial and Appeal Board (see D.I. 103 in 12-cv-01702-RGA, D.I. 96 in 12-cv-01704-RGA, D.I. 92 in 12-cv-01703-RGA, D.I. 104 in 12-cv-01701-RGA, D.I. 86 in 12-cv-01788-RGA) on 9/16/2014, at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/7/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
August 6, 2014 Filing 132 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Supplemental Responses to Defendants' First Set of Common Interrogatories Relating to the Call Processing Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
August 6, 2014 Filing 131 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Callwave Communications, LLC's Supplemental Responses to Defendants' First Set of Common Interrogatories Relating to the '933 Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
August 4, 2014 Filing 130 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Second Common Interrogatories to Plaintiff CallWave Communications, LLC Relating to the Call Processing Track (No. 7) filed by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P..(Kraftschik, Stephen)
August 4, 2014 Filing 129 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendants' Second Set of Common Interrogatories to Plaintiff Relating to the '933 Track (No. 7); and (2) Defendants' Second Common Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff Relating to the '970 Track (No. 9) filed by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P..(Kraftschik, Stephen)
August 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER Granting (114 in 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 77 in 1:13-cv-00711-RGA, 131 in 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 110 in 1:12-cv-01788-RGA, 124 in 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 132 in 1:12-cv-01701-RGA) Proposed Agreed Protective Order, filed by CallWave Communications LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/4/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA et al.(nms)
August 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 127 SO ORDERED Granting (106 in 1:12-cv-01788-RGA, 127 in 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 111 in 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 120 in 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 74 in 1:13-cv-00711-RGA) Proposed Order Regarding Discovery, Including Discovery of Electronically Stored Information ("ESI"), filed by Google Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/4/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA, 1:13-cv-00711-RGA(nms)
August 1, 2014 Filing 126 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) Callwave Communications, LLC's Initial Proposed Claim Constructions for the '970 Track and 2) Callwave Communications, LLC's Initial Proposed Claim Constructions for the '933 Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
July 31, 2014 Filing 125 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendants' Initial Proposed Claim Constructions Relating to the '933 Patent; and (2) Defendants' Initial Proposed Claim Constructions Relating to the '970 Patent filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
July 28, 2014 Filing 124 PROPOSED Stipulated Protective Order, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Johnson, Edmond) Modified on 7/29/2014 (nms).
July 21, 2014 Filing 123 REQUEST for Oral Argument by AT & T Mobility LLC, Blackberry Corporation, Blackberry Limited, AT&T Inc., AT&T Mobility LLC, Google Inc., T-Moblie USA Inc., Cellco Partnership, Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P. re 96 MOTION to Stay. (Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 7/22/2014 (nms).
July 17, 2014 Filing 122 REPLY BRIEF re 101 MOTION to Amend Complaint filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (Johnson, Edmond)
July 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORAL ORDER: On the Letter, Exhibit A (see D.I. 70 in 13-cv-00711-RGA, D.I. 104 in 12-cv-01703-RGA, D.I. 112 in 12-cv-01704-RGA, D.I. 119 in 12-cv-01701-RGA, D.I. 119 in 12-cv-01702-RGA, D.I. 98 in 12-cv-01788-RGA), the Court prefers the more narrowly tailored CallWave position. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/17/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA et al.(nms)
July 16, 2014 Filing 120 Proposed Order Regarding Discovery, Including Discovery of Electronically Stored Information ("ESI"), by Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul) Modified on 7/17/2014 (nms).
July 15, 2014 Filing 119 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Paul Saindon regarding the proposed Protective Order and in response to CallWave's letter dated July 7, 2014. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-2)(Saindon, Paul)
July 14, 2014 Filing 118 REPLY BRIEF re 96 MOTION to Stay Proceedings on the '970 Patent Pending Inter Partes Review by the Patent Trial and Appeal Board filed by Cellco Partnership, Google Inc., Verizon Services Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Dellinger, Megan)
July 11, 2014 Filing 117 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Callwave Communications, LLC's List of Claim Terms for which Constructions Will Be Proposed filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
July 10, 2014 Filing 116 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendants' Preliminary List of Claim Terms that Require Construction and/or are Indefinite for the '933 Track; and (2) Defendants' Preliminary List of Claim Terms that Require Construction and/or are Indefinite for the '970 Track filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
July 10, 2014 Filing 115 Official Transcript of Discovery Dispute held on 07-08-14 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leonard A. Dibbs. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/31/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/11/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/8/2014. (lad)
July 8, 2014 Filing 114 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Lauren Reznick as co-counsel. Reason for request: No longer with the firm.. (McMillan, James)
July 8, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Andrews - Discovery Conference held on 7/8/2014. (Court Reporter Leonard Dibbs.) Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA et al.(ksr, )
July 8, 2014 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Gregory S. Bishop for CallWave Communications LLC added for electronic noticing. (dmp, )
July 7, 2014 Filing 113 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 101 MOTION to Amend Complaint filed by Google Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 7/17/2014. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
July 7, 2014 Filing 112 Letter to Honorable Richard G. Andrews from James G. McMillan, III regarding Protective Order. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-B)(McMillan, James) Modified on 7/8/2014 (nms).
July 7, 2014 Filing 111 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from James G. McMillan, III regarding CallWave Communications, LLC's Response to Defendants' July 3, 2014 letter. (McMillan, James) Modified on 7/8/2014 (nms).
July 7, 2014 Filing 110 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding discovery dispute. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-B)(Blumenfeld, Jack)
July 3, 2014 Filing 109 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 96 MOTION to Stay Proceedings on the '970 Patent Pending Inter Partes Review by the Patent Trial and Appeal Board, filed by CallWave Communications LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 7/14/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-E, # 2 Exhibits F-I, # 3 Exhibits J-L, # 4 Certificate of Service)(McMillan, James) Modified on 7/8/2014 (nms).
July 3, 2014 Filing 108 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from James G. McMillan, III regarding Discovery Dispute. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-F)(McMillan, James) Modified on 7/8/2014 (nms).
July 3, 2014 Filing 107 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding discovery dispute. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
July 1, 2014 Filing 106 NOTICE of Subpoena on Vipul Sawhney by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Subpoena)(Saindon, Paul)
June 27, 2014 Filing 105 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Preliminary Invalidity Contentions Relating to the Call Processing Track filed by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P..(Tennyson, Eleanor)
June 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORAL ORDER: The parties have advised that a discovery dispute has arisen requiring judicial attention. The Court will hold a Discovery conference on 7/8/2014, at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews to take up this issue. In preparation for this conference the parties shall follow the Discovery Matters and Disputes procedure as set forth in the Scheduling Order. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/26/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA et al.(nms)
June 20, 2014 Filing 103 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Amended Disclosure of Defendant Google Inc. Pursuant to Paragraph 3.A of the Proposed Order Regarding Discovery filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
June 20, 2014 Filing 102 NOTICE of Subpoenas on Fuze Box, Inc. and FuzeBox Software Corp. by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-4)(Saindon, Paul)
June 17, 2014 Set Answering Brief Deadline re 101 MOTION to Amend Complaint. Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 7/7/2014. (nms)
June 17, 2014 Filing 101 MOTION to Amend Complaint - filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Second Amended Complaint, # 2 Redlined Version, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E)(Johnson, Edmond) Modified on 6/18/2014 (nms).
June 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 100 SO ORDERED Granting 98 Stipulation and Proposed Order to Substitute Party, filed by CallWave Communications LLC (see Stipulation for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/17/2014. (nms)
June 17, 2014 Filing 99 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Gregory S. Bishop - filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Edmond)
June 17, 2014 Filing 98 STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Substitute Party, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Johnson, Edmond) Modified on 6/17/2014 (nms).
June 17, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (94 in 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 99 in 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 105 in 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 88 in 1:12-cv-01788-RGA, 106 in 1:12-cv-01701-RGA) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Gregory S. Bishop filed by CallWave Communications LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/17/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
June 16, 2014 Filing 97 OPENING BRIEF in Support re 96 MOTION to Stay Proceedings on the '970 Patent Pending Inter Partes Review by the Patent Trial and Appeal Board, filed by Cellco Partnership, Google Inc., Verizon Communications Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 7/3/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-6)(Dellinger, Megan) Modified on 6/17/2014 (nms).
June 16, 2014 Filing 96 MOTION to Stay Proceedings on the '970 Patent Pending Inter Partes Review by the Patent Trial and Appeal Board - filed by AT & T Mobility LLC, Blackberry Corporation, Blackberry Limited, AT&T Mobility LLC, Google Inc., T-Moblie USA Inc., Cellco Partnership, Verizon Communications Inc., Sprint Nextel Corp.. (Dellinger, Megan) Modified on 6/17/2014 (nms).
June 10, 2014 Filing 95 NOTICE of Subpoenas on Fuze Box, Inc. and FuzeBox Software Corp. by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 & 2)(Saindon, Paul)
May 29, 2014 Filing 94 NOTICE OF SERVICE of CallWave Communications, LLC's Responses to Defendants' 1) First Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things for the '970 Track; 2) First Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things for the Call Procesing Track; and 3) First Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things for the '933 Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
May 29, 2014 Filing 93 NOTICE OF SERVICE of CallWave Communications, LLC's Responses to Defendants' 1) First Set of Individual Interrogatories for the '970 Track (Nos. 1-3); 2) First Set of Individual Interrogatories for the Call Procesing Track (Nos. 1-3); and 3) First Set of Individual Interrogatories for the '933 Track (Nos. 1-3) filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
May 16, 2014 Filing 92 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendants' Initial Invalidity Contentions on the '933 Patent and (2) Defendants' Initial Invalidity Contentions the '970 patent filed by Sprint Nextel Corp..(Kraftschik, Stephen)
May 13, 2014 Filing 91 NOTICE Of Service of Callwave Communications, Llc's Subpoena to Amdocs, Inc., and Danal Inc., D/b/a Billtomobile, and Telecommunications Systems, Inc., filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(McMillan, James) Modified on 5/14/2014 (nms).
May 12, 2014 Filing 90 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) CallWave Communications, LLC's Disclosure of Infringement Contentions against Google, Inc. regarding the Call Processing Track and 2) CallWave Communications, LLC's Corrected Disclosure of Infringement Contentions against Google, Inc. regarding the Call Processing Track in C.A. No. 12-1701-RGA and C.A. No. 12-1704 filed by CallWave Communications LLC filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
May 12, 2014 Filing 89 NOTICE OF SERVICE of CallWave Communications, LLC's Disclosure of Infringement Contentions against Verizon Communications, Inc., and Cellco Partnership, d/b/a Verizon Wireless regarding the Call Processing Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
May 8, 2014 Filing 88 NOTICE OF SERVICE of CallWave Communications, LLC's Responses to Google's First Set of Requests for Production to Plaintiff Relating to the Call Processing Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
May 8, 2014 Filing 87 NOTICE OF SERVICE of CallWave Communications, LLC's Responses to Google's First Set of Requests for Production to Plaintiff Relating to the '933 Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
May 6, 2014 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Robert J. Scheffel for Verizon Communications Inc. added for electronic noticing. (dmp, )
May 6, 2014 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Adrienne G. Johnson for Verizon Communications Inc. added for electronic noticing. (dmp, )
May 2, 2014 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Floyd B. Chapman for Verizon Communications Inc. added for electronic noticing. (dmp, )
April 30, 2014 Filing 86 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Floyd B. Chapman, Robert J. Scheffel and Adrienne Johnson - filed by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Communications Inc.. (Schladweiler, Benjamin)
April 30, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 86 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Floyd B. Chapman, Robert J. Scheffel and Adrienne Johnson, filed by None, Verizon Wireless, Cellco Partnership, Verizon Communications Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/30/2013. (nms)
April 24, 2014 Filing 85 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendants Verizon Communications Inc. and Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless's First Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things for the 970 Track; (2) Defendants Verizon Communications Inc. and Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless's First Set of Individual Interrogatories for the 970 Track; (3) Defendants Verizon Communications Inc. and Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless's First Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things for the 933 Track; (4) Defendants Verizon Communications Inc. and Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless's First Set of Individual Interrogatories for the 933 Track; (5) Defendants Verizon Communications Inc. and Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless's First Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things for the Call Processing Track; and (6) Defendants Verizon Communications Inc. and Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless's First Set of Individual Interrogatories for the Call Processing Track filed by Verizon Communications Inc..(Schladweiler, Benjamin)
April 24, 2014 Filing 84 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Benjamin Snitkoff as co-counsel. Reason for request: no longer with the firm. (Johnson, Edmond)
April 15, 2014 Filing 83 NOTICE OF SERVICE of CallWave Communications, LLC's Disclosures of Infringement Contentions Relating to the '933 Track and '970 Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
April 9, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Andrews - Discovery Conference held on 4/9/2014. (Court Reporter Heather Triozzi - Hawkins Reporting Service.) Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA et al.(ksr, )
April 8, 2014 Filing 82 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from James G. McMillan, III regarding Discovery Dispute - re (55 in 1:13-cv-00711-RGA) Letter. (McMillan, James)
April 7, 2014 Filing 81 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Paul Saindon regarding Protective Order and ESI Order Disputes. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-10)(Saindon, Paul)
April 4, 2014 Filing 80 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) CallWave Communications, LLC's Responses to Defendants' First Common Set of Interrogatories Relating to the '970 Track; and 2) CallWave Communications, LLC's Responses to Defendants' First Set of Common Interrogatories Relating to the '933 Track filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
April 4, 2014 Filing 79 NOTICE OF SERVICE of CallWave Communications, LLC's Responses to Defendants' First Common Interrogatories Relating to the Call Processing Track (Nos. 1-6) filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
April 3, 2014 Filing 78 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Google's First Set of Requests for Production to Plaintiff Relating to the '933 Track filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
April 3, 2014 Filing 77 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Google's First Requests for Production to Plaintiff Relating to the Call Processing Track filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
April 3, 2014 Filing 76 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Google's First Set of Requests for Production to Plaintiff Relating to the '970 Track filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
April 1, 2014 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Leah R. McCoy,Suparna Datta for CallWave Communications LLC added for electronic noticing. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA et al.(dmp, )
March 28, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 75 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Suparna Datta filed by CallWave Communications LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/28/2014. (nms)
March 27, 2014 Filing 75 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Suparna Datta - filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McMillan, James)
March 25, 2014 Filing 74 NOTICE OF SERVICE of CallWave Communications, LLC's Disclosure Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Default Discovery Standard filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
March 24, 2014 Filing 73 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Disclosure of Defendant Google Inc. Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Delaware Default Standard for Discovery and Paragraph 3 of the Proposed Order Regarding Discovery, Including Discovery of Electronically Stored Information filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
March 24, 2014 Filing 72 NOTICE of SERVICE of Defendants Verizon Communications Inc. and Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless's Paragraph 3 Disclosures by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Communications Inc. (Schladweiler, Benjamin)
March 21, 2014 Filing 71 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Leah R. McCoy - filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McMillan, James)
March 21, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 71 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Leah R. McCoy filed by CallWave Communications LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/21/2014. (nms)
March 20, 2014 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Christopher Boundy for CallWave Communications LLC added for electronic noticing. (dmp, )
March 13, 2014 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER: The parties have advised that a discovery dispute has arisen requiring judicial attention. The Court will hold a Discovery conference on 4/9/2014, at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews, to take up this issue. In preparation for this conference the parties shall follow the Discovery Matters and Disputes procedure as set forth in the Scheduling Order.. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/13/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA et al.(ksr, )
March 10, 2014 Filing 70 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christopher Boundy - filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certification by Christopher Boundy, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(McMillan, James)
March 10, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 70 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christopher Boundy filed by CallWave Communications LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/10/2014. (nms)
February 28, 2014 Filing 69 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' First Set of Common Interrogatories to Plaintiff Relating to the '970 Track filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
February 28, 2014 Filing 68 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' First Common Interrogatories to Plaintiff CallWave Communications, LLC Relating to the Call Processing Track filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
February 28, 2014 Filing 67 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' First Set of Common Interrogatories to Plaintiff Relating to the '933 Track filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
February 28, 2014 Filing 66 NOTICE of SERVICE of Defendants Verizon Communications Inc. and Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless's Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's (i) First Set of Common Interrogatories for the (a) Call Processing Track, (b) '933 Track, and (c) '970 Track; (ii) First Collective Requests for Production for the (a) Call Processing Track, (b) '933 Track, and (c) '970 Track; and (iii) First Set of Interrogatories to Verizon for the (a) '933 Track, and (b) '970 Track by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Communications Inc. (Schladweiler, Benjamin)
February 28, 2014 Filing 65 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Google's Responses to Plaintiff's First Requests for Production to Google Related to the Call Processing Track (1-11); (2) Google Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Callwave Communications, LLC's First Collective Requests for Production to all Defendants Related to the '933 Track (1-26); (3) Google Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Callwave Communications, LLC's First Collective Requests for Production to All Defendants Related to the '970 Track (1-26); (4) Google Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Callwave Communications, LLC's First Collective Requests for Production to all Defendants Related to the Call processing Track (1-26); (5) Google's Response to Plaintiff's First Interrogatories to Google Regarding the '933 Track (1); (6) Google Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Callwave Communications, LLC's First Interrogatories to Google Regarding the '970 Track (1); (7) Google Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Callwave Communications, LLC's First Interrogatories to Google Regarding the Call Processing Track (1); (8) Google's Response to Plaintiff's First Collective Interrogatories to the '933 Track Defendants (1-7); (9) Google's Responses to Plaintiff's First Collective Interrogatories to the '970 Track Defendants (1-7); and (10) Google's Responses to Plaintiff's First Collective Interrogatories to the Call Processing Track Defendants (1-7) filed by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul)
February 25, 2014 Filing 64 Amended Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent None, Other Affiliate Verizon Wireless for Verizon Communications Inc. filed by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Communications Inc.. (Schladweiler, Benjamin)
February 25, 2014 Filing 63 ANSWER to 18 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand, by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Communications Inc..(Schladweiler, Benjamin) Modified on 2/26/2014 (nms).
February 25, 2014 Filing 62 ANSWER to 18 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand, by Google Inc..(Saindon, Paul) Modified on 2/25/2014 (nms).
February 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 61 SO ORDERED, re (60 in 1:12-cv-01788-RGA, 60 in 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 68 in 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 72 in 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 65 in 1:12-cv-01703-RGA) MOTION to Set the Time to Answer the Complaints, filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, Google Inc., AT & T Mobility LLC, T-Moblie USA Inc., Cellco Partnership, Sprint Nextel Corp., Verizon Communications Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/4/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
February 3, 2014 Filing 60 MOTION to Set the Time to Answer the Complaints - filed by AT & T Mobility LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, Google Inc., T-Moblie USA Inc., Cellco Partnership, Verizon Communications Inc., Sprint Nextel Corp.. (Saindon, Paul)
January 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER: On or before February 13, 2014, each party or each party group shall email to Magistrate Judge Thynge, with a copy to her Judicial Administrator, Cathleen Kennedy, the information required in the Order. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 1/30/14. (cak)
January 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER Granting (D.I. 30 in 12-cv-01701-RGA) MOTION to Dismiss, and Granting in part and Denying in part (D.I. 32 in 12-cv-01701-RGA); Granting (D.I. 26 in 12-cv-01702-RGA) MOTION to Dismiss, and Granting in part and Denying in part (D.I. 28 in 12-cv-01702-RGA) MOTION to Dismiss; Granting (D.I. 27 in 12-cv-01703-RGA) MOTION to Dismiss, and Granting in part and Denying in part (D.I. 24 in 12-cv-01703-RGA) MOTION to Dismiss; Granting (D.I. 23 in 12-cv-01704-RGA) MOTION to Dismiss, and Granting in part and Denying in part (D.I. 25 in 12-cv-01704-RGA) MOTION to Dismiss; and Granting in part and Denying in part (D.I. 27 in 12-cv-01788-RGA) MOTION to Dismiss. Plaintiff is given leave to file a second amended complaint including indirect infringement claims within two weeks. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/28/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(nms)
January 27, 2014 Filing 57 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) Plaintiff's First Collective Interrogatories (1-7) to '933 Track Defendants, 2) Plaintiff's First Collective Interrogatories (1-7) to '970 Track Defendants; 3) Plaintiff's First Collective Requests for Production (1-26) to All '933 Track Defendants; and 4) Plaintiff's First Collective Requests for Production (1-26) to All '970 Track Defendants filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(Johnson, Edmond)
January 27, 2014 Filing 56 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's First Collective Interrogatories (1-7) to Call Processing Track Defendants AT&T Mobility, LLC, Google Inc., Sprint Nextel Corp., Verizon Comunications, Inc., Cellco Partnership, d.b.a. Verizon Wireless, and Broadsoft, Inc. and Plaintiff's First Collective Requests for Production (1-26) Related to All Call Processing Track Defendants AT&T Mobility, LLC, Google Inc., Sprint Nextel Corp., Verizon Comunications, Inc., Cellco Partnership, d.b.a. Verizon Wireless, and Broadsoft, Inc. filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(Johnson, Edmond)
January 27, 2014 Filing 55 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff CallWave Communications, LLC's Identification of Accused Products, Asserted Patents, and Asserted Claims to All Defendants filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(Johnson, Edmond)
January 27, 2014 Filing 54 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's First Interrogatories to Verizon Communications, Inc and Cellco Partnership, d.b.a. Verizon Wireless, Regarding the '933 Track (1) and Plaintiff's First Interrogatories to Verizon Communications, Inc and Cellco Partnership, d.b.a. Verizon Wireless, Relating to the '970 Track (1) filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(Johnson, Edmond)
January 27, 2014 Filing 53 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's First Request for Production of Documents to Google, Inc. Related to the Call Processing Track (1-11) filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(Johnson, Edmond)
January 27, 2014 Filing 52 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) Plaintiff's First Interrogatories to Google, Inc. Relating to the '970 Track (1); 2) Plaintiff's First Interrogatories to Google, Inc. Regarding the Call Processing Track (1); and 3) Plaintiff's First Interrogatories to Google, Inc. Regarding the '933 Track (1) filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(Johnson, Edmond)
January 13, 2014 Filing 51 NOTICE of SERVICE of Defendants Verizon Communications Inc. and Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless's Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Communications Inc. (Schladweiler, Benjamin)
January 13, 2014 Filing 50 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures of Google Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) filed by Google Inc..(Blumenfeld, Jack)
January 13, 2014 Filing 49 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff CallWave Communications, LLC's Rule 26(A) Initial Disclosures filed by CallWave Communications LLC.(McMillan, James)
January 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER Setting Teleconference: Counsel for Callwave to initiate the call. A Telephone Conference is set for 1/27/2014 at 2:30 PM EASTERN TIMNE before Judge Mary Pat Thynge to discuss ADR. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 1/7/14. (cak)
January 7, 2014 CASE REFERRED to Mediation. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(cak)
January 6, 2014 CASE REFERRED to Judge Thynge for Mediation. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA, 1:13-cv-00711-RGA(cak)
December 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 47 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case referred to the Magistrate Judge for the purpose of exploring ADR. Joinder of Parties due by 6/17/2014. Amended Pleadings due by 6/17/2014. Fact Discovery due by 2/25/2015. A Trial Scheduling Conference is set for 8/28/2015, at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews Dispositive Motions due by 5/28/2015, and 8/7/2015. Joint Claim Construction Briefs due by 10/9/2014, and 12/10/2014. A Markman Hearings are set for 10/29/2014, and 1/7/2015, at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/20/2013. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA et al.(nms)
December 20, 2013 Filing 46 Proposed Scheduling Order, by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James) Modified on 12/20/2013 (nms).
December 20, 2013 CORRECTING ENTRY: DI 46 has been removed per request of the filer. (cla, )
December 17, 2013 Filing 45 Official Transcript of Scheduling Conference held on 12-12-13 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leonard A. DIbbs. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/7/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/17/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/17/2014. (lad)
December 12, 2013 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER: The Motion to Sever (D.I. 37 ) is DISMISSED AS PREMATURE, as discussed at the Rule 16 hearing on December 12, 2013. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/12/2013. (nms)
December 12, 2013 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Andrews - Scheduling Conference held on 12/12/2013. (Court Reporter Leonard Dibbs.) Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA et al.(ksr, )
December 10, 2013 Filing 44 PROPOSED Scheduling Order, by CallWave Communications LLC. (Johnson, Edmond) Modified on 12/11/2013 (nms).
December 6, 2013 Filing 43 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding consideration of Defendants' motion to sever in connection with upcoming scheduling conference. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
December 5, 2013 Filing 42 REPLY BRIEF re 37 MOTION to Sever filed by Cellco Partnership, Google Inc., Verizon Communications Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
November 25, 2013 Filing 41 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 37 MOTION to Sever filed by CallWave Communications LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 12/5/2013. (McMillan, James)
November 18, 2013 Filing 40 Order Setting Rule 16(b) Conference: A Scheduling Conference is set for 12/12/2013, at 1:00 PM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/18/2013. (nms)
November 15, 2013 Filing 39 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding pending motions to sever and scheduling conference. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
November 11, 2013 Filing 38 OPENING BRIEF in Support re 37 MOTION to Sever filed by Cellco Partnership, Google Inc., Verizon Communications Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 11/29/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A-B, # 2 Exhibit A)(Saindon, Paul)
November 8, 2013 Filing 37 MOTION to Sever - filed by AT & T Mobility LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, Google Inc., T-Moblie USA Inc., Cellco Partnership, Verizon Communications Inc., Sprint Nextel Corp.. (Saindon, Paul)
November 7, 2013 Filing 36 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Edmond D. Johnson, Esq. regarding Request for a Scheduling Conference. (Johnson, Edmond)
September 16, 2013 Filing 35 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by CallWave Communications LLC identifying Corporate Parent no corporate parent or other affiliate for CallWave Communications LLC.. (McMillan, James)
September 4, 2013 Filing 34 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding response to Plaintiff's September 3, 2013 letter - re (18 in 1:13-cv-00711-RGA, 38 in 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 44 in 1:12-cv-01748-RGA, 36 in 1:12-cv-01788-RGA, 36 in 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 38 in 1:13-cv-00074-RGA, 33 in 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 43 in 1:12-cv-01701-RGA) Letter. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
September 3, 2013 Filing 33 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Edmond D. Johnson, Esq. regarding request for scheduling conference. (Johnson, Edmond)
July 29, 2013 Filing 32 NOTICE of Subsequent Authority by CallWave Communications LLC re 26 Answering Brief in Opposition, to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(McMillan, James)
July 25, 2013 Filing 31 NOTICE of Subsequent Authority by AT&T Mobility LLC, T-Moblie USA Inc., Cellco Partnership, Google Inc., Verizon Communications Inc., Sprint Nextel Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Blumenfeld, Jack)
July 8, 2013 Filing 30 REPLY BRIEF re 25 MOTION to Dismiss, filed by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Communications Inc.. (Schladweiler, Benjamin) Modified on 7/9/2013 (nms).
July 8, 2013 Filing 29 REPLY BRIEF re 23 MOTION to Dismiss, filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-D)(Saindon, Paul) Modified on 7/9/2013 (nms).
July 1, 2013 Filing 28 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Verizon Communications Inc. and Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless to file its reply brief in support of its Motion to Dismiss the Willful Infringement Claims in CallWave's Amended Complaint to July 8, 2013 - filed by CallWave Communications LLC, Cellco Partnership, Verizon Communications Inc.. (Schladweiler, Benjamin)
July 1, 2013 Filing 27 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant Google Inc. to file its reply brief in support of its motion to dismiss to July 8, 2013 - filed by Google Inc., CallWave Communications LLC. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
July 1, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (30 in 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 37 in 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 27 in 1:12-cv-01704-RGA) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant Google Inc. to file its reply brief in support of its Motion to dismiss to July 8, 2013, filed by Google Inc., CallWave Communications LLC (Reset Briefing Schedule: re 27 in 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 23 in 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 26 in 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 30 in 1:12-cv-01701-RGA; MOTIONS to Dismiss. Reply Briefs due 7/8/2013)s. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/1/2013. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA(nms)
July 1, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 28 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Verizon Communications Inc. and Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless to file its reply brief to 25 Motion to Dismiss to July 8, 2013, filed by CallWave Communications LLC, Cellco Partnership, Verizon Communications Inc. (Reset Briefing Schedule: re 25 MOTION to Dismiss. Reply Brief due 7/8/2013). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/1/2013. (nms)
June 20, 2013 Filing 26 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re [23 MOTION to Dismiss, and 25 MOTION to Dismiss, filed by CallWave Communications LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 7/1/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(McMillan, James) Modified on 6/25/2013 (nms).
June 4, 2013 Remark: Set Answering Brief Deadline re 25 MOTION to Dismiss. Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 6/20/2013. (nms)
June 3, 2013 Filing 25 MOTION to Dismiss the Willful Infringement Claims in CallWave's Amended Complaint - filed by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Communications Inc.. (Schladweiler, Benjamin) Modified on 6/4/2013 (nms).
June 3, 2013 Filing 24 OPENING BRIEF in Support re 23 MOTION to Dismiss the Willful Infringement Claims in Callwave's Amended Complaints Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, filed by Google Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 6/20/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 6/4/2013 (nms).
June 3, 2013 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss the Willful Infringement Claims in Callwave's Amended Complaints Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure - filed by Google Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 6/4/2013 (nms).
May 6, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 22 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer First Amended Complaint to June 3, 2013, filed by Google Inc., CallWave Communications LLC, Cellco Partnership, Verizon Communications Inc. (Reset Answer Deadlines: Cellco Partnership answer due 6/3/2013; Google Inc. answer due 6/3/2013; Verizon Communications Inc. answer due 6/3/2013). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/3/2013. (nms)
May 3, 2013 Filing 22 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer First Amended Complaint to June 3, 2013 - filed by CallWave Communications LLC, Cellco Partnership, Google Inc., Verizon Communications Inc.. (Saindon, Paul)
April 29, 2013 Filing 21 NOTICE of Withdraw re 14 MOTION to Dismiss - filed by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Communications Inc.. (Schladweiler, Benjamin) Modified on 4/29/2013 (nms).
April 26, 2013 Filing 20 NOTICE to Withdraw 11 MOTION to Dismiss - filed by Google Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 4/29/2013 (nms).
April 19, 2013 Filing 19 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 6,771,970 B1; US 7,907,933 B1; US 7,636,428 B2; US 7,882,188 B1; US 8,064,588 B2; . (McMillan, James)
April 19, 2013 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER: The parties shall advise as to whether the Motions to Dismiss (D.I. 11 and 14 ) are now viewed as moot per the filing of 18 Amended Complaint. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/19/2013. (nms)
April 18, 2013 Filing 18 First Amended COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Cellco Partnership, Google Inc., Verizon Communications Inc.- filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(McMillan, James) Modified on 4/19/2013 (nms).
April 18, 2013 Filing 17 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 11 MOTION to Dismiss, 14 MOTION to Dismiss filed by CallWave Communications LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 4/29/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(McMillan, James)
April 9, 2013 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Karin A. Hessler for Verizon Communications Inc. added for electronic noticing. (dmp, )
April 8, 2013 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Kevin P. Anderson,Paul M. Kim for Verizon Communications Inc. added for electronic noticing. (dmp, )
April 4, 2013 Filing 16 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kevin P. Anderson, Karin A. Hessler and Paul M. Kim - filed by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Communications Inc.. (Schladweiler, Benjamin)
April 4, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 16 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kevin P. Anderson, Karin A. Hessler and Paul M. Kim filed by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Communications Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/4/2013. (nms)
April 3, 2013 Remark: Set Answering Brief Deadline re 14 MOTION to Dismiss. Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 4/19/2013. (nms)
April 2, 2013 Filing 15 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Communications Inc. identifying Corporate Parent None for Verizon Communications Inc.; Other Affiliate Verizon Communications Inc., Other Affiliate Vodafone Group Plc for Cellco Partnership.. (Schladweiler, Benjamin)
April 2, 2013 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss - filed by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Communications Inc.. (Schladweiler, Benjamin) Modified on 4/2/2013 (nms).
April 1, 2013 Filing 13 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Google Inc. identifying Corporate Parent None for corporate parent or other public affiliates for Google Inc... (Blumenfeld, Jack)
April 1, 2013 Filing 12 OPENING BRIEF in Support re 11 MOTION to Dismiss, filed by Google Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 4/18/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 4/1/2013 (nms).
April 1, 2013 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss - filed by Google Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 4/1/2013 (nms).
March 22, 2013 Pro Hac Vice Attorney James F. Hurst,Scott R. Samay,Peter Lambrianakos,Krishnan Padmanabhan,Xi Chen for Google Inc. added for electronic noticing. (dmp, )
March 13, 2013 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Cellco Partnership, D.B.A. Verizon Wireless on 3-13-2013, filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (McMillan, James)
March 13, 2013 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CallWave Communications LLC. Verizon Communications Inc. served on 3/12/2013, answer due 4/2/2013. (Johnson, Edmond)
March 12, 2013 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Cellco Partnership on 3/12/2013; Verizon Communications Inc. on 3/12/2013. (cla, )
March 8, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney James F. Hurst, Scott R. Samay, Peter Lambrianakos, Krishnan Padmanabhan and Xi Chen filed by Google Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/8/2013. (nms)
March 7, 2013 Filing 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney James F. Hurst, Scott R. Samay, Peter Lambrianakos, Krishnan Padmanabhan and Xi Chen - filed by Google Inc.. (Saindon, Paul)
March 6, 2013 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance of Jack B. Blumenfeld and Paul Saindon on behalf of Google Inc. by Google Inc. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
February 7, 2013 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Lauren Reznick for CallWave Communications LLC added for electronic noticing. (dmp, )
February 6, 2013 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Lauren Reznick for CallWave Communications LLC,Lauren Reznick for CallWave Communications LLC,Lauren Reznick for CallWave Communications LLC added for electronic noticing. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00074-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01748-RGA, 1:12-cv-01788-RGA(els)
February 5, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Lauren Reznick filed by CallWave Communications LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/5/2013. (nms)
February 4, 2013 Filing 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Lauren Reznick - filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Lauren Reznick, Esq.)(McMillan, James)
January 31, 2013 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by CallWave Communications LLC: For Google Inc. waiver sent on 1/30/2013, answer due 4/1/2013. (Johnson, Edmond)
December 26, 2012 Pro Hac Vice Attorney William D. Belanger for CallWave Communications LLC added for electronic noticing. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA(dmp, )
December 21, 2012 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Benjamin Snitkoff for CallWave Communications LLC,Benjamin Snitkoff for CallWave Communications LLC,Benjamin Snitkoff for CallWave Communications LLC,Benjamin Snitkoff for CallWave Communications LLC added for electronic noticing. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA(rbe)
December 21, 2012 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Noah V. Malgeri for CallWave Communications LLC,Noah V. Malgeri for CallWave Communications LLC,Noah V. Malgeri for CallWave Communications LLC,Noah V. Malgeri for CallWave Communications LLC added for electronic noticing. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01704-RGA, 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA(rbe)
December 20, 2012 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney William D. Belanger, Noah V. Malgeri, Benjamin M. Snitkoff filed by CallWave Communications LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/20/2012. (nms)
December 19, 2012 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01701-RGA, 1:12-cv-01702-RGA, 1:12-cv-01703-RGA, 1:12-cv-01704-RGA (rjb)
December 17, 2012 Filing 4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney William D. Belanger, Noah V. Malgeri, Benjamin M. Snitkoff - filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of William D. Belanger, # 2 Certification of Noah V. Malgeri, # 3 Certification of Benjamin M. Snitkoff)(Johnson, Edmond)
December 12, 2012 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,771,970 B1; 7,907,933 B1; 7,636,428 B2;. (els)
December 12, 2012 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction (els)
December 12, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, Google Inc., Verizon Communications Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0311-1190019.) - filed by CallWave Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(els)
December 12, 2012 No Summons Issued (els)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CallWave Communication LLC v. Verizon Communications Inc. et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CallWave Communications LLC
Represented By: William D. Belanger
Represented By: Edmond D. Johnson
Represented By: Noah V. Malgeri
Represented By: James Gordon McMillan, III
Represented By: Benjamin Snitkoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verizon Communications Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cellco Partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?