Princeton Digital Image Corporation v. Office Depot Inc.
Plaintiff: Princeton Digital Image Corporation
Defendant: Office Depot Inc.
Case Number: 1:2013cv00239
Filed: February 15, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Andrews
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 279 MEMORANDUM ORDER re (275 in 1:13-cv-00288-LPS, 290 in 1:13-cv-00408-LPS, 274 in 1:13-cv-00289-LPS, 274 in 1:13-cv-00331-LPS, 275 in 1:13-cv-00239-LPS, 275 in 1:13-cv-00287-LPS, 272 in 1:13-cv-00330-LPS, 273 in 1:13-cv-00404-LPS, 272 in 1:13-cv-00326 -LPS) MOTION For Entry of Final Judgment filed by Adobe Systems Incorporated is GRANTED IN PART. (260 in 1:13-cv-00289-LPS, 261 in 1:13-cv-00287-LPS, 258 in 1:13-cv-00330-LPS, 276 in 1:13-cv-00408-LPS, 260 in 1:13-cv-00331-LPS, 258 in 1:13-cv -00326-LPS, 261 in 1:13-cv-00288-LPS, 261 in 1:13-cv-00239-LPS, 259 in 1:13-cv-00404-LPS) MOTION for Sanctions filed by Adobe Systems Incorporated is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/25/17. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00239-LPS et al. (ntl)
August 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 260 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Adobe's motion to disqualify Mr. O'Kelly (C.A. No. 13-239-LPS D.I. 240; C.A. No. 13-287-LPS D.I. 240; C.A. No. 13-288-LPS D.I. 240; C.A. No. 13-289-LPS D.I. 243; C.A. No. 13-326-LPS D.I. 241; C.A. No. 13-330-LPS D.I. 237; C.A. No. 13-331-LPS D.I. 239; C.A. No. 13-404-LPS D.I. 242; C.A. No. 13-408-LPS D.I. 255) is GRANTED. PDIC's motion to strike Dr. Becker's supplemental expert report (C.A. No. 13-239-LPS D.I. 241; C.A. No. 13-287-LPS D.I. 242; C.A. No. 13- 288-LPS D.I. 242; C.A. No. 13-289-LPS D.I. 240; C.A. No. 13-326-LPS D.I. 238; C.A. No. 13-330-LPS D.I. 240; C.A. No. 13-331-LPS D.I. 242; C.A. No. 13-404-LPS D.I. 240; C.A. No. 13-408-LPS D.I. 258) is GRANTED. PDIC's motion for summary judgment (C.A. No. 13-239-LPS D.I. 234; C.A. No. 13-287-LPS D.I. 234; C.A. No. 13-288-LPS D.I. 234; C.A. No. 13-289-LPS D.I. 233; C.A. No. 13-326-LPS D.I. 231; C.A. No. 13-330-LPS D.I. 231; C.A. No. 13-331-LPS D.I. 233; C.A. No. 13-404-LPS D.I. 232; C.A. No. 13-408-LPS D.I. 249) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/17/17. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00239-LPS et al. (ntl)
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 237 MEMORANDUM ORDER re Rulings on the various motions in limine. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/9/17. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00239-LPS et al. (ntl)
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 220 MEMORANDUM OPINION re pending motions. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/1/2017. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00239-LPS et al.(etg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Princeton Digital Image Corporation v. Office Depot Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Princeton Digital Image Corporation
Represented By: Sean T. O'Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office Depot Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?