Parallel Iron LLC v. Nokia Inc. Featured Case
Plaintiff: Parallel Iron LLC
Defendant: Cloudera Inc., Groupon Inc., JPMorgan Chase & Co., Nokia Inc., Twitter Inc., Visa Inc., Qualcomm Incorporated, Rackspace US Inc., Trulia Inc., Ebay Inc., Paypal Inc. and Wal-Mart Stores Inc.
Case Number: 1:2013cv00443
Filed: March 18, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: New Castle
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Andrews
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2014 Filing 102 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,197,662; 7,958,388; 7,543,177. (Attachments: # 1 Order)(nms)
January 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER Granting 100 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Based With Prejudice, filed by Parallel Iron LLC, Nokia Inc. (***Civil Case Terminated). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/27/2014. (nms)
January 26, 2014 Filing 100 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Plaintiff's Claims for Relief Against NOKIA INC., With Prejudice - filed by Nokia Inc., Parallel Iron LLC. (Stamoulis, Stamatios)
January 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER Granting 98 Joint MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice, filed by Parallel Iron LLC (***Civil Case Terminated). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on /24/2014. (nms)
January 24, 2014 Remark: Case reopened as it was closed in error. (nms)
January 23, 2014 Filing 98 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Plaintiff's Claims for Relief Against Defendants based on Defendants' use of Products or Services Obtained from Cloudera With Prejudice - filed by Parallel Iron LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Weinblatt, Richard)
January 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER Granting 92 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Plaintiff's Claims for Relief against Cloudera and Cloudera's Counterclaims for Relief Against Plaintiff, with Prejudice, filed by Parallel Iron LLC (Cloudera Inc. terminated). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/14/2014. (nms)
January 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER Granting 91 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Plaintiff's Claims for Relief against Walmart, With Prejudice, filed by Parallel Iron LLC, Wal-Mart Stores Inc. terminated.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/14/2014. (nms)
January 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER Granting 90 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Plaintiff's Claims for Relief against Rackspace, With Prejudice, filed by Parallel Iron LLC (Rackspace US Inc. terminated). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/14/2014. (nms)
January 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER Granting 89 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Plaintiff's Claims for Relief against PayPal, Inc., With Prejudice, filed by Parallel Iron LLC (Paypal Inc. terminated). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/14/2014. (nms)
January 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER Granting 88 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Plaintiff's Claims for Relief against eBay, With Prejudice, filed by Parallel Iron LLC (Ebay Inc. terminated). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/14/2014. (nms)
January 13, 2014 Filing 92 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Plaintiff's Claims for Relief against Cloudera and Cloudera's Counterclaims for Relief Against Plaintiff, with Prejudice - filed by Parallel Iron LLC. (Weinblatt, Richard)
January 13, 2014 Filing 91 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Plaintiff's Claims for Relief against Walmart, With Prejudice - filed by Parallel Iron LLC. (Weinblatt, Richard)
January 13, 2014 Filing 90 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Plaintiff's Claims for Relief against Rackspace, With Prejudice - filed by Parallel Iron LLC. (Weinblatt, Richard)
January 13, 2014 Filing 89 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Plaintiff's Claims for Relief against PayPal, Inc., With Prejudice - filed by Parallel Iron LLC. (Weinblatt, Richard)
January 13, 2014 Filing 88 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Plaintiff's Claims for Relief against eBay, With Prejudice - filed by Parallel Iron LLC. (Weinblatt, Richard)
January 6, 2014 Filing 87 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Parallel Iron, LLC on January 24, 2014 filed by Facebook Inc., Amazon Web Services LLC, Amazon.com Inc., Cloudera Inc., Linkedin Corporation, Netflix Inc., EMC Corporation.(Flynn, Michael)
January 2, 2014 Filing 86 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Parallel Iron, LLC's Notice of Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition of Defendant Cloudera, Inc. filed by Parallel Iron LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Stamoulis, Stamatios)
December 24, 2013 Filing 85 NOTICE of Subpoena of RING Technology Enterprises, Inc. by Cloudera Inc. (Flynn, Michael)
December 23, 2013 Filing 84 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1 -2) by Defendant Cloudera, Inc. to Plaintiff Parallel Iron, LLC; (2) Defendant Cloudera, Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Plaintiff Parallel Iron, LLC's First Set of Requests for Production of Documents and Things Directed to Defendants (Nos. 1-46); and (3) Defendant Cloudera, Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Plaintiff Parallel Iron, LLC's First Set of Interrogatories to Cloudera (Nos. 1-13) filed by Cloudera Inc..(Flynn, Michael)
December 18, 2013 Filing 83 NOTICE Of Service of Second Set of Interrogatories (13-18), filed by Parallel Iron LLC.(Stamoulis, Stamatios) Modified on 12/18/2013 (nms).
November 27, 2013 Filing 82 Official Transcript of Markman Hearing held on 11-26-13 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter/Transcriber Valerie Gunning. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/18/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/30/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/25/2014. (lad)
November 26, 2013 Filing 81 NOTICE Of Service of Substitute First Set of Requests for Production of Documents and Information to Defendants, by Parallel Iron LLC.(Stamoulis, Stamatios) Modified on 11/26/2013 (nms).
November 26, 2013 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Andrews - Markman Hearing held on 11/26/2013. (Court Reporter Valerie Gunning.) Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-00763-RGA et al.(ksr, )
November 22, 2013 Filing 80 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Karen Jacobs regarding revised Joint Claim Construction chart. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 & 2)(Jacobs, Karen)
November 20, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (61 in 1:13-cv-00367-RGA, 56 in 1:12-cv-00877-RGA, 57 in 1:12-cv-00880-RGA, 79 in 1:13-cv-00443-RGA, 63 in 1:12-cv-00763-RGA, 83 in 1:12-cv-00764-RGA, 53 in 1:12-cv-00995-RGA, 57 in 1:12-cv-00876-RGA, 62 in 1:13-cv-00307-RGA, 55 in 1:12-cv-01035-RGA) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Shekhar Vyas filed by Parallel Iron LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/20/2013. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-00763-RGA et al.(nms)
November 19, 2013 Filing 79 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Shekhar Vyas - filed by Parallel Iron LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Compliance, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Stamoulis, Stamatios)
November 15, 2013 Filing 78 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL re Parallel Iron LLC: Entry of appearance of attorney Richard Charles Weinblatt. Attorney Richard D. Kirk, Stephen B. Brauerman and Vanessa R. Tiradentes of Bayard, P.A. and Marc A. Fenster, Alexander C.D. Giza, Paul A. Kroeger and Jacob Buzcko of Russ, August & Kabat terminated. (Weinblatt, Richard)
November 12, 2013 Filing 77 REDACTED VERSION of 70 Joint Claim Construction Brief, by Parallel Iron LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-C)(Brauerman, Stephen) Modified on 11/13/2013 (nms).
November 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER Granting 75 Proposed Protective Order, filed by Parallel Iron LLC, Cloudera Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/12/2013. (nms)
November 11, 2013 Filing 75 Joint Proposed Protective Order, by Cloudera Inc., Parallel Iron LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 11/12/2013 (nms).
November 7, 2013 Filing 74 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Cloudera Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Plaintiff Parallel Iron, LLC's First Set of Requests for Admission (Nos. 1-4) by Cloudera Inc..(Flynn, Michael)
November 5, 2013 Filing 73 REDACTED VERSION of 71 Expert Declaration of Ian Jestice, by Parallel Iron LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Brauerman, Stephen) Modified on 11/6/2013 (nms).
November 2, 2013 Filing 72 Joint CLAIM Construction Chart, by Parallel Iron LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-B, # 2 Exhibit C, # 3 Exhibit 1-12)(Brauerman, Stephen) Modified on 11/4/2013 (nms).
November 2, 2013 Filing 71 [SEALED] Expert Declaration of Ian Jestice re Joint Claim Construction Brief, by Parallel Iron LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Brauerman, Stephen) Modified on 11/4/2013 (nms).
November 2, 2013 Filing 70 [SEALED] Joint Claim Construction Brief, by Parallel Iron LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Certificate of Service)(Brauerman, Stephen) Modified on 11/4/2013 (nms).
October 31, 2013 Filing 69 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Unified Patents on November 12, 2013 by Parallel Iron LLC.(Bussiere, Sara)
October 30, 2013 Filing 68 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Supplemental Invalidity Contentions by Facebook Inc., Amazon Web Services LLC, Amazon.com Inc., Cloudera Inc., Google Inc, Linkedin Corporation, Netflix Inc., Orbitz LLC, EMC Corporation.(Flynn, Michael)
October 25, 2013 Filing 67 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Sur-Reply Claim Construction Brief by Google Inc.(Flynn, Michael)
October 25, 2013 Filing 66 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jacob R. Buczko - filed by Parallel Iron LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Jacob R. Buczko)(Brauerman, Stephen)
October 25, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (57 in 1:13-cv-00307-RGA, 66 in 1:13-cv-00443-RGA, 48 in 1:13-cv-00367-RGA) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jacob R. Buczko filed by Parallel Iron LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/25/2013. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00307-RGA, 1:13-cv-00367-RGA, 1:13-cv-00443-RGA(nms)
October 21, 2013 Filing 65 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Cloudera, Inc.'s Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 4(b) of the Default Standard for Discovery Including Discovery of Electronically Stored Information by Cloudera Inc..(Blumenfeld, Jack)
October 18, 2013 Filing 64 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Eric Sammer on December 17, 2013 at 9:00 a.m. by Parallel Iron LLC.(Bussiere, Sara)
October 18, 2013 Filing 63 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Nong Li on December 13, 2013 at 9:00 a.m. by Parallel Iron LLC.(Bussiere, Sara)
October 11, 2013 Filing 62 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Plaintiff Parallel Iron, LLC's First Set of Requests For Production of Documents and Information to Defendant Cloudera, Inc.; (2) Plaintiff Parallel Iron, LLC's First Set of Interrogatories to Defendant Cloudera Inc. (Nos. 1-12); and (3) this Notice of Service by Parallel Iron LLC.(Tiradentes, Vanessa)
October 4, 2013 Filing 61 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Plaintiff Parallel Iron, LLC's First Set of Requests for Admission to Defendant Cloudera, Inc.; and (2) this Notice of Service by Parallel Iron LLC.(Tiradentes, Vanessa)
September 27, 2013 Filing 60 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Answering Claim Construction Brief and the Expert Declaration of Ian Jestice by Orbitz LLC.(Tennyson, Eleanor)
September 26, 2013 Filing 59 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Plaintiff Parallel Iron, LLCs Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(A)(1) and (2) This Notice of Service by Parallel Iron LLC.(Brauerman, Stephen)
September 25, 2013 Filing 58 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures of Defendant Cloudera, Inc. by Cloudera Inc..(Blumenfeld, Jack)
September 18, 2013 Filing 57 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Parallel Iron's Disclosures Pursuant to Section 4(a) of the Delaware Default Standard for Discovery of Electronically Stored Information and (2) this Notice of Service by Parallel Iron LLC.(Brauerman, Stephen)
September 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 56 SO ORDERED re 55 Proposed Stipulated Scheduling Order, filed by Parallel Iron LLC, Cloudera Inc. (Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Amended Pleadings due by 12/13/2013, Joint Claim Construction Brief due by 11/1/2013, Fact Discovery due by 2/14/2014., Dispositive Motions and Daubert Motions due by 8/15/2014, A Final Pretrial Conference is set for 12/19/2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews, the first Jury Trial is set for 1/5/2015, at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews, A Markman Hearing is set for 11/26/2013, at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews, A Trial Sequencing Conference is set for 9/5/2014, at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews) (see Stipulation for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/6/2013. (nms)
September 5, 2013 Filing 55 STIPULATION re Scheduling Order, by Cloudera Inc., Parallel Iron LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 9/9/2013 (nms).
September 2, 2013 Filing 54 Official Transcript of Motion to Stay held on 08-30-13 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leonard A. Dibbs. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/23/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/3/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/2/2013. (lad)
August 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER Granting 45 MOTION to Sever and Enter a Scheduling Order, filed by Cloudera Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/30/2013. (nms)
August 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER Granting 21 MOTION to Stay the Claims Against the Customer Defendants, filed by Nokia Inc., Paypal Inc., eBay Inc., Visa Inc., Twitter Inc., Qualcomm Incorporated, Ebay Inc., Cloudera Inc., JPMorgan Chase & Co., Wal-Mart Stores Inc., Rackspace US Inc., Trulia Inc., Groupon Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/30/2013. (nms)
August 30, 2013 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Andrews - Oral Argument held on 8/30/2013. (Court Reporter Leonard Dibbs.) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00443-RGA, 1:12-cv-00878-RGA, 1:12-cv-00879-RGA, 1:12-cv-00995-RGA(ksr, )
August 28, 2013 Filing 51 RESPONSE to 49 MOTION for Leave to File a Supplemental Brief in Further Opposition to Motion to Stay, filed by Cloudera Inc., Ebay Inc., Groupon Inc., JPMorgan Chase & Co., Nokia Inc., Paypal Inc., Qualcomm Incorporated, Rackspace US Inc., Trulia Inc., Twitter Inc., Visa Inc., Wal-Mart Stores Inc.. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 8/29/2013 (nms).
August 28, 2013 Filing 50 PROPOSED Scheduling Order, by Cloudera Inc., Ebay Inc., Groupon Inc., JPMorgan Chase & Co., Nokia Inc., Parallel Iron LLC, Paypal Inc., Qualcomm Incorporated, Rackspace US Inc., Trulia Inc., Twitter Inc., Visa Inc., Wal-Mart Stores Inc.. (Kirk, Richard) Modified on 8/28/2013 (nms).
August 21, 2013 Remark: Set Answering Brief Deadline re 49 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Brief. Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 9/6/2013. (nms)
August 20, 2013 Filing 49 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Brief in Opposition to Motion to Stay Claims Against Customer Defendants - filed by Parallel Iron LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B (Part 1), # 3 Exhibit B (Part 2), # 4 Exhibit B (Part 3), # 5 Exhibit B (Part 4), # 6 Exhibit B (Part 5), # 7 Exhibit B (Part 6), # 8 Exhibit B (Part 7), # 9 Exhibit B (Part 8), # 10 Exhibit B (Part 9), # 11 Exhibit B (Part 10), # 12 Exhibit B (Part 11), # 13 Proposed Order)(Brauerman, Stephen) Modified on 8/21/2013 (nms).
August 19, 2013 Filing 48 REPLY BRIEF re 45 MOTION to Sever and Enter a Scheduling Order filed by Cloudera Inc.. (Tigan, Jeremy)
August 8, 2013 Filing 47 RESPONSE to 45 MOTION to Sever and Enter a Scheduling Order, filed by Parallel Iron LLC. (Brauerman, Stephen) Modified on 8/9/2013 (nms).
August 5, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 46 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to 45 Motion to Sever to August 8, 2013, filed by Parallel Iron LLC (Reset Briefing Schedule: re 45 MOTION to Sever and Enter a Scheduling Order. Answering Brief due 8/8/2013). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/5/2013. (nms)
August 1, 2013 Filing 46 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Plaintiff to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Sever to August 8, 2013 - filed by Parallel Iron LLC. (Brauerman, Stephen)
July 16, 2013 Remark: Set Answering Brief Deadline re 45 MOTION to Sever and Enter a Scheduling Order. Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 8/1/2013. (nms)
July 15, 2013 Filing 45 MOTION to Sever and Enter a Scheduling Order - filed by Cloudera Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 7.1.1 Certification, # 2 Exhibits A-B, # 3 Proposed Order)(Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 7/16/2013 (nms).
July 3, 2013 Filing 44 Order Setting Rule 16(b) Conference: A Scheduling Conference is set for 8/30/2013, at 3:00 PM in Chambers before Judge Richard G. Andrews (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/3/2013. (nms)
July 2, 2013 Pro Hac Vice Attorney David R. Pekarek Krohn for Cloudera Inc. added for electronic noticing. (dmp, )
June 20, 2013 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER: The Court will hear oral argument on the MOTION to Stay (D.I. 21 ) on 8/30/2013, at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/20/2013. (nms)
June 14, 2013 Filing 43 REPLY BRIEF re 21 MOTION to Stay the Claims Against the Customer Defendants, filed by Cloudera Inc., Ebay Inc., Groupon Inc., JPMorgan Chase & Co., Nokia Inc., Paypal Inc., Qualcomm Incorporated, Rackspace US Inc., Trulia Inc., Twitter Inc., Visa Inc., Wal-Mart Stores Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-C)(Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 6/17/2013 (nms).
June 12, 2013 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Brock S. Weber for Amazon.com Inc.,Brock S. Weber for Cloudera Inc.,Brock S. Weber for Linkedin Corporation,Brock S. Weber for Netflix Inc. added for electronic noticing. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01035-RGA, 1:12-cv-00763-RGA, 1:12-cv-00877-RGA, 1:13-cv-00443-RGA(els)
June 10, 2013 Filing 42 ANSWER to 20 Answer to Complaint, and Counterclaims, by Parallel Iron LLC.(Brauerman, Stephen) Modified on 6/11/2013 (nms).
June 10, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED Granting 41 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Parallel Iron to Answer Cloudera Inc.'s Counterclaim and for Defendants to file their Reply Brief in Support of their Motion to Stay to June 10, 2013 and June 14, filed by Parallel Iron LLC (Reset Answer Deadlines: Parallel Iron LLC answer due 6/10/2013; Reset Briefing Schedule: re 21 MOTION to Stay: Reply Brief due 6/14/2013). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/10/2013. (nms)
June 7, 2013 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Christopher Kao for Amazon.com Inc.,Christopher Kao for Cloudera Inc.,Christopher Kao for Linkedin Corporation,Christopher Kao for Netflix Inc. added for electronic noticing. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01035-RGA, 1:12-cv-00763-RGA, 1:12-cv-00877-RGA, 1:13-cv-00443-RGA(els)
June 6, 2013 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Nancy Cheng for Cloudera Inc. added for electronic noticing. (els)
June 3, 2013 Filing 41 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Parallel Iron to Answer Defendant Cloudera Inc.'s Counterclaim and for Defendants to file their Reply Brief in Support of their Motion to Stay Claims Against the Customer Defendants to June 10, 2013 and June 14, 2013 - filed by Parallel Iron LLC. (Brauerman, Stephen) Modified on 6/4/2013 (nms).
June 3, 2013 Filing 40 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christopher Kao; Brock S. Weber; Nancy Cheng; and David Pekarek Krohn - filed by Cloudera Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
June 3, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 40 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christopher Kao; Brock S. Weber; Nancy Cheng; and David Pekarek Krohn filed by Cloudera Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/3/2013. (nms)
May 31, 2013 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Alexas D Skucas for Nokia Inc. added for electronic noticing. (els)
May 30, 2013 Filing 39 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Richard K. Herrmann as co-counsel.. (Herrmann, Richard)
May 28, 2013 Filing 38 DECLARATION of Paul Kroeger, Esquire re 37 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Parallel Iron LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)(Brauerman, Stephen) Modified on 5/29/2013 (nms).
May 28, 2013 Filing 37 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 21 MOTION to Stay the Claims Against the Customer Defendants, filed by Parallel Iron LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 6/7/2013. (Brauerman, Stephen) Modified on 5/29/2013 (nms).
May 20, 2013 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Mark H. Francis for Nokia Inc. added for electronic noticing. (els)
May 15, 2013 Corporate Affiliates/Parents added per Disclosure Statement: identifying Corporate Parent Nokia Corporation for Nokia Inc.. (Tigan, Jeremy)
May 14, 2013 Filing 36 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John Russell Emerson, Travis Patterson and Lamont A. Jefferson of HAYNES AND BOONE, LLP - filed by Rackspace US Inc.. (Smith, Rodger)
May 14, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 36 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John Russell Emerson, Travis Patterson and Lamont A. Jefferson of HAYNES AND BOONE, LLP filed by Rackspace US Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/14/2013. (nms)
May 14, 2013 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT NOTICE: In conjunction with the disclosure statement docketed in this action (SEE DI# 26 , corporate parents and other affiliates should be added to the case. The event code ADD CORPORATE AFFILIATES/PARENTS, found in the OTHER DOCUMENTS list, should be used to add this information. (rwc)
May 13, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 35 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Alexas D. Skucas, Esq. and Mark H. Francis, Esq. filed by Nokia Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/13/2013. (nms)
May 10, 2013 Filing 35 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Alexas D. Skucas, Esq. and Mark H. Francis, Esq. - filed by Nokia Inc.. (Tigan, Jeremy)
May 10, 2013 Filing 34 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Wal-Mart Stores Inc.. (Tigan, Jeremy)
May 10, 2013 Filing 33 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Paypal Inc. identifying Corporate Parent eBay Inc. for Paypal Inc... (Tigan, Jeremy)
May 10, 2013 Filing 32 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Ebay Inc.. (Tigan, Jeremy)
May 10, 2013 Filing 31 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Trulia Inc.. (Tigan, Jeremy)
May 10, 2013 Filing 30 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Rackspace US Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Rackspace Hosting Inc. for Rackspace US Inc... (Tigan, Jeremy)
May 10, 2013 Filing 29 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Qualcomm Incorporated. (Tigan, Jeremy)
May 10, 2013 Filing 28 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Visa Inc.. (Tigan, Jeremy)
May 10, 2013 Filing 27 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Twitter Inc.. (Tigan, Jeremy)
May 10, 2013 Filing 26 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Nokia Inc.. (Tigan, Jeremy)
May 10, 2013 Filing 25 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by JPMorgan Chase & Co.. (Tigan, Jeremy)
May 10, 2013 Filing 24 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Groupon Inc.. (Tigan, Jeremy)
May 10, 2013 Filing 23 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Cloudera Inc.. (Tigan, Jeremy)
May 10, 2013 Filing 22 OPENING BRIEF in Support re 21 MOTION to Stay the Claims Against the Customer Defendants filed by Cloudera Inc., Ebay Inc., Groupon Inc., JPMorgan Chase & Co., Nokia Inc., Paypal Inc., Qualcomm Incorporated, Rackspace US Inc., Trulia Inc., Twitter Inc., Visa Inc., Wal-Mart Stores Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 5/28/2013. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
May 10, 2013 Filing 21 MOTION to Stay the Claims Against the Customer Defendants - filed by Cloudera Inc., Ebay Inc., Groupon Inc., JPMorgan Chase & Co., Nokia Inc., Paypal Inc., Qualcomm Incorporated, Rackspace US Inc., Trulia Inc., Twitter Inc., Visa Inc., Wal-Mart Stores Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 7.1.1 Certification)(Blumenfeld, Jack)
May 10, 2013 Filing 20 ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with JURY DEMAND , COUNTERCLAIM against Parallel Iron LLC by Cloudera Inc..(Blumenfeld, Jack)
April 23, 2013 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Paul A. Kroeger for Parallel Iron LLC added for electronic noticing. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00307-RGA, 1:13-cv-00367-RGA, 1:13-cv-00443-RGA(els)
April 18, 2013 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Marc A. Fenster,Alexander C. D. Giza for Parallel Iron LLC,added for electronic noticing. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00443-RGA, 1:13-cv-00307-RGA, 1:13-cv-00367-RGA(els)
April 4, 2013 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Matthew A. Argenti,Ryan R. Smith,James C. Yoon for Groupon Inc. added for electronic noticing. (dmp, )
April 1, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 19 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint,filed by Parallel Iron LLC (Reset Answer Deadlines: Cloudera Inc. answer due 5/10/2013; Ebay Inc. answer due 5/10/2013; Groupon Inc. answer due 5/10/2013; JPMorgan Chase & Co. answer due 5/10/2013; Nokia Inc. answer due 5/10/2013; Paypal Inc. answer due 5/10/2013; Qualcomm Incorporated answer due 5/10/2013; Rackspace US Inc. answer due 5/10/2013; Trulia Inc. answer due 5/10/2013; Twitter Inc. answer due 5/10/2013; Wal-Mart Stores Inc. answer due 5/10/2013). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/1/2013. (nms)
March 28, 2013 Filing 19 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint - filed by Parallel Iron LLC. (Brauerman, Stephen) Modified on 4/1/2013 (nms).
March 28, 2013 Filing 18 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint to May 10, 2013 - filed by Visa Inc.. (Horwitz, Richard)
March 28, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 18 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint to May 10, 2013, filed by Visa Inc. (Reset Answer Deadlines: Visa Inc. answer due 5/10/2013). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/28/2013. (nms)
March 26, 2013 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Parallel Iron LLC. Wal-Mart Stores Inc. served on 3/20/2013, answer due 4/10/2013. (Brauerman, Stephen)
March 26, 2013 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Parallel Iron LLC. Nokia Inc. served on 3/20/2013, answer due 4/10/2013. (Brauerman, Stephen)
March 26, 2013 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Parallel Iron LLC. Qualcomm Incorporated served on 3/20/2013, answer due 4/10/2013. (Brauerman, Stephen)
March 26, 2013 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Parallel Iron LLC. Ebay Inc. served on 3/20/2013, answer due 4/10/2013. (Brauerman, Stephen)
March 26, 2013 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Parallel Iron LLC. Groupon Inc. served on 3/20/2013, answer due 4/10/2013. (Brauerman, Stephen)
March 26, 2013 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Parallel Iron LLC. Twitter Inc. served on 3/20/2013, answer due 4/10/2013. (Brauerman, Stephen)
March 26, 2013 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Parallel Iron LLC. Rackspace US Inc. served on 3/20/2013, answer due 4/10/2013. (Brauerman, Stephen)
March 26, 2013 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Parallel Iron LLC. Cloudera Inc. served on 3/20/2013, answer due 4/10/2013. (Brauerman, Stephen)
March 26, 2013 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Parallel Iron LLC. JPMorgan Chase & Co. served on 3/20/2013, answer due 4/10/2013. (Brauerman, Stephen)
March 26, 2013 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Parallel Iron LLC. Visa Inc. served on 3/20/2013, answer due 4/10/2013. (Brauerman, Stephen)
March 26, 2013 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Parallel Iron LLC. Trulia Inc. served on 3/20/2013, answer due 4/10/2013. (Brauerman, Stephen)
March 26, 2013 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Parallel Iron LLC. Paypal Inc. served on 3/20/2013, answer due 4/10/2013. (Brauerman, Stephen)
March 26, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Matthew A. Argenti, Attorney Ryan R. Smith, and Attorney James C. Yoon filed by Groupon Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/26/2013. (nms)
March 25, 2013 Filing 5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Matthew A. Argenti, Attorney Ryan R. Smith, and Attorney James C. Yoon - filed by Groupon Inc.. (Herrmann, Richard)
March 21, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (15 in 1:13-cv-00307-RGA, 4 in 1:13-cv-00443-RGA, 6 in 1:13-cv-00367-RGA) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Marc A. Fenster, Alexander C.D. Giza and Paul A. Kroeger filed by Parallel Iron LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/21/2013. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00307-RGA, 1:13-cv-00367-RGA, 1:13-cv-00443-RGA(nms)
March 20, 2013 Filing 4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Marc A. Fenster, Alexander C.D. Giza and Paul A. Kroeger - filed by Parallel Iron LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Marc A. Fenster, # 2 Certification of Alexander C.D. Giza, # 3 Certification of Paul A. Kroeger)(Brauerman, Stephen)
March 20, 2013 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
March 19, 2013 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Cloudera Inc. on 3/19/2013; Ebay Inc. on 3/19/2013; Groupon Inc. on 3/19/2013; JPMorgan Chase & Co. on 3/19/2013; Nokia Inc. on 3/19/2013; Paypal Inc. on 3/19/2013; Qualcomm Incorporated on 3/19/2013; Rackspace US Inc. on 3/19/2013; Trulia Inc. on 3/19/2013; Twitter Inc. on 3/19/2013; Visa Inc. on 3/19/2013; Wal-Mart Stores Inc. on 3/19/2013. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (dmp, )
March 18, 2013 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,197,662; 7,958,388; 7,543,177;. (dmp, )
March 18, 2013 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction (dmp, )
March 18, 2013 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Cloudera Inc., Ebay Inc., Groupon Inc., JPMorgan Chase & Co., Nokia Inc., Paypal Inc., Qualcomm Incorporated, Rackspace US Inc., Trulia Inc., Twitter Inc., Visa Inc., Wal-Mart Stores Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 311-1251960.) - filed by Parallel Iron LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(dmp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parallel Iron LLC v. Nokia Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Parallel Iron LLC
Represented By: Stephen B. Brauerman
Represented By: Marc A. Fenster
Represented By: Alexander C. D. Giza
Represented By: Richard D. Kirk
Represented By: Vanessa Ribeiro Tiradentes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cloudera Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Groupon Inc.
Represented By: Matthew A. Argenti
Represented By: Richard K. Herrmann
Represented By: Ryan R. Smith
Represented By: James C. Yoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase & Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nokia Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twitter Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Visa Inc.
Represented By: Richard L. Horwitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Qualcomm Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rackspace US Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trulia Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ebay Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paypal Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?