Intellectual Ventures I LLC et al v. Toshiba Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Intellectual Ventures I LLC and Intellectual Ventures II LLC
Defendant: Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba America Inc., Toshiba America Electronic Components Inc. and Toshiba America Information Systems Inc.
Case Number: 1:2013cv00453
Filed: March 20, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Sue L. Robinson
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 587 MEMORANDUM ORDER regarding the disputed claim language of U.S. Patent No. 5,701,270. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 1/24/2017. (nmfn)
January 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 574 MEMORANDUM ORDER, IT IS ORDERED that Toshiba is not estopped from presenting the Fuse combination at trial, and Toshiba's request for reconsideration of claim construction of the '270 patent is denied. See Memorandum Order for further details. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 1/11/2017. (nmfn)
December 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 559 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 12/19/2016. (nmfn)
September 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 501 MEMORANDUM ORDER granting 405 MOTION to Amend/Correct Amended Answers, Defenses and Counterclaims filed by Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba America Information Systems Inc., Toshiba America Inc., Toshiba America Electronic Components Inc. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 9/7/2016. (nmfn)
December 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 277 MEMORANDUM ORDER re: claim construction. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 12/17/2015. (nmfn)
August 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 184 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 8/17/15. (kjk)
May 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 150 MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 40 MOTION to Stay. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 5/15/2015. (fms)
March 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 96 MEMORANDUM ORDER granting in part and denying in part 56 MOTION to Stay Toshiba's Patent Misuse and Antitrust Claims and Defenses filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC, Intellectual Ventures I LLC. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 3/20/2015. (nmfn)
September 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 9/3/2014. (nmfn)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Intellectual Ventures I LLC et al v. Toshiba Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Intellectual Ventures I LLC
Represented By: John M. Desmarais
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Jon T. Hohenthaner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Intellectual Ventures II LLC
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba Corporation
Represented By: Brian A. Biggs
Represented By: Denise Seastone Kraft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba America Inc.
Represented By: Brian A. Biggs
Represented By: Denise Seastone Kraft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba America Electronic Components Inc.
Represented By: Brian A. Biggs
Represented By: Denise Seastone Kraft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba America Information Systems Inc.
Represented By: Brian A. Biggs
Represented By: Denise Seastone Kraft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?