StrikeForce Technologies Inc. v. PhoneFactor Inc.
Plaintiff: StrikeForce Technologies Inc.
Defendant: First Midwest Bancorp Inc., PhoneFactor Inc. and Fiserv Inc.
Petitioner: Peter S. Tawil
Case Number: 1:2013cv00490
Filed: March 28, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Referring Judge: Mary Pat Thynge
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 20, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 20, 2016 Filing 233 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 7,870,599 B2. (Attachments: #1 Order)(nms)
January 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ORDER Granting #231 Stipulation of Dismissal, filed by StrikeForce Technologies Inc. (***Civil Case Terminated). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/20/2016. (nms)
January 20, 2016 Filing 231 STIPULATION of Dismissal by StrikeForce Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caponi, Steven)
January 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 230 ORDER Granting (229 in 13-cv-490-RGA-MPT, 12 in 15-cv-465-RGA) Stipulation To Stay. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/15/2016. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00490-RGA-MPT, 1:15-cv-00465-RGA(nms)
January 14, 2016 Filing 229 STIPULATION to Stay by PhoneFactor Inc., Microsoft Corporation. (Farnan, Brian)
December 7, 2015 Filing 228 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Andrew C. Cooper as co-counsel.. (Farnan, Brian)
December 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ORDER Setting Mediation Conferences: A Mediation Conference is set for 1/13/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6C before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 12/4/2015. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00490-RGA-MPT, 1:15-cv-00465-RGA(lih)
December 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 226 ORAL ORDER: There being no objections, the Report and Recommendations (D.I. #213 ) is ADOPTED. The Motion for Leave to Amend Its Complaint (D.I. #125 ) is DENIED. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/2/2015. (nms)
December 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 225 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties shall endeavor to conduct any further mediation by 1/15/16 subject to the availability of Judge Fallon and the parties. Supplementations of Existing Expert Reports due 1/15/16; Rebuttals to Supplementations of Existing Expert Reports due by 2/12/2016; Supplemental Expert Reports (e.g. Secondary Considerations) due 3/4/16; Expert Discovery due by 4/1/2016. Dispositive Motions due by 5/16/2016. A Final Pretrial Conference is set for 12/22/2016 at 02:00 PM in Chambers before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 12/12/2016. A 5-day Jury Trial is set for 1/9/2017 beginning at 9:30 AM with the subsequent trial days beginning at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 12/2/15. (cak)
November 30, 2015 Filing 224 PROPOSED Amended Scheduling Order, by PhoneFactor Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Letter to The Honorable Mary Pat Thynge)(Farnan, Brian) Modified on 12/1/2015 (nms).
November 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 223 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re #222 Joint Letter. IT IS ORDERED that: 1. Plaintiffs request for interpretation of the words isolation and facilities is DENIED. 2. The stay as ordered on June 10, 2015 is lifted. The parties shall provide a proposed Scheduling Order on or before November 30, 2015. 3. The due date for any objections to the Report and Recommendation dated May 26, 2015 denying plaintiffs motion to amend/correct shall be filed on or before November 30, 2015. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 11/9/15. (cak)
October 27, 2015 Filing 222 Joint Letter to The Honorable Mary Pat Thynge from Steven L. Caponi regarding Positions regarding Stay - re #216 Order. (Caponi, Steven)
October 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORAL ORDER: The Court is in receipt of the parties' report of 10/13/15. Upon review, the parties' request for an additional two weeks to allow further evaluation is granted. They shall advise of their positions at that time. Ordered by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 10/14/15. (cak)
October 13, 2015 Filing 220 Letter to Chief Magistrate Judge Thynge from Steven L. Caponi regarding Parties Position regarding Terminating Stay - re #216 Order. (Caponi, Steven)
September 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 219 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Plaintiff's objections (D.I. #180 ) are OVERRULED. The Report and Recommendation (D.I. #168 ) is ADOPTED, with the modification that the structure for "biometric analyzer," "voice recognition means," and "voice sampling means" is that set forth earlier in this Memorandum Order. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/29/2015. (nms)
September 1, 2015 Filing 218 Joint NOTICE of Identifying Asserted Claims by StrikeForce Technologies Inc.. (Caponi, Steven) Modified on 9/1/2015 (nms).
August 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORAL ORDER: The parties are requested to identify which claims are asserted and where that information might be found in the docket. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/31/2015. (nms)
June 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER re #215 GRANTING the Request For a Stay effective June 5, 2015 ( SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS ). Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 6/10/15. (kjk)
June 9, 2015 Filing 215 Letter to The Honorable Mary Pat Thynge from Steven L. Caponi regarding enclosing proposed form of order. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caponi, Steven)
June 5, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mary Pat Thynge - Telephone Conference re: discovery dispute held on 6/5/2015; The transcript shall serve as the order of the court. (Court Reporter Taneyah Carroll.) (kjk)
June 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORAL ORDER: In light of Strike Force's letter dated May 22, 2015, a teleconference is scheduled for Friday, June 5, 2015 at 3:30 pm to be initiated by counsel for Strike Force. Issued by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 6/1/15. (kjk)
May 26, 2015 Filing 213 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #125 DENYING the MOTION to Amend/Correct #68 Amended Complaint filed by StrikeForce Technologies Inc.. Please note that when filing Objections pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b)(2), briefing consists solely of the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages) and the Response to the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages). No further briefing shall be permitted with respect to objections without leave of the Court. Objections to R&R due by 6/12/2015. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 5/26/15. (kjk)
May 22, 2015 Filing 212 Letter to The Honorable Mary Pat Thynge from Steven L. Caponi regarding Request for a Teleconference. (Caponi, Steven)
May 18, 2015 Filing 211 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (i) PhoneFactor, Inc.'s Objections and Second Supplemental Responses to StrikeForce Technologies, Inc.'s First Set of Common Interrogatories; (ii) Damages Report of Matthew Lynde; and (iii) Noninfringement Report of Dr. Avi D. Rubin filed by PhoneFactor Inc..(Farnan, Brian)
May 18, 2015 Filing 210 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rebuttal Expert Report of Alan T. Sherman, Ph.D. and Exhibits filed by StrikeForce Technologies Inc..(Caponi, Steven)
April 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER Setting Mediation Conferences: A Mediation Conference is set for 5/20/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6C before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 4/15/2015. (lih)
April 14, 2015 Filing 208 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Expert Report of Gregory Urbanchuk filed by StrikeForce Technologies Inc..(Caponi, Steven)
April 13, 2015 Filing 207 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Invalidity Report of Avi D. Rubin, Ph.D. filed by PhoneFactor Inc..(Farnan, Brian)
April 13, 2015 Filing 206 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Revised Infringement Contentions filed by StrikeForce Technologies Inc..(Caponi, Steven)
April 13, 2015 Filing 205 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Infringement Report of Alan T. Sherman Ph.D. with Exhibits filed by StrikeForce Technologies Inc..(Caponi, Steven)
April 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER Setting Teleconference: plaintiffs counsel shall initiate the call. A Telephone Conference is set for 4/14/2015 at 11:00 AM before Judge Sherry R. Fallon to discuss ADR. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 4/9/2015. (lih)
April 9, 2015 CASE REFERRED to Judge Fallon for Mediation. (lih)
March 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORAL ORDER: A teleconference has been scheduled for 4/9/15 at 10:30 AM Eastern Time with Judge Thynge. Plaintiff's counsel shall initiate the teleconference call. Ordered by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 3/31/15. (cak)
March 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORAL ORDER: The teleconference scheduled for 3/26/15 at 4:00 PM Eastern Time with Judge Thynge is being rescheduled to 3/31/15 at 4:30 PM Eastern Time. Ordered by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 3/25/15. (cak)
March 25, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #199 Stipulation to Amend Scheduling Order. Opening expert report: 4/13/15; Rebuttal expert reports: 5/18/15; Supplemental reports: 6/5/15; Close of expert discovery 6/15/15. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 3/25/15. (cak)
March 24, 2015 Filing 201 REDACTED VERSION of #194 Declaration of Gabriel Holloway, by PhoneFactor Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Farnan, Michael) Modified on 3/24/2015 (nms).
March 24, 2015 Filing 200 REDACTED VERSION of #193 Letter, by PhoneFactor Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-C)(Farnan, Michael)
March 23, 2015 Filing 199 STIPULATION Amending Scheduling Order regarding Expert Reports by PhoneFactor Inc.. (Farnan, Brian)
March 23, 2015 Filing 198 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Chandra Sekhar Surapaneni on March 26, 2015 filed by StrikeForce Technologies Inc..(Caponi, Steven)
March 23, 2015 Filing 197 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Scott Harrington on March 27, 2015 filed by StrikeForce Technologies Inc..(Caponi, Steven)
March 23, 2015 Filing 196 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Steven Dispensa on March 25, 2015 filed by StrikeForce Technologies Inc..(Caponi, Steven)
March 23, 2015 Filing 195 REDACTED VERSION of #191 Letter, by StrikeForce Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exh. A, #2 Exh. B, #3 Exh. C, #4 Exh. D, #5 Exh. E, #6 Exh. F, #7 Exh. G, #8 Exh. H, #9 Exh. I, #10 Exh. J)(Caponi, Steven)
March 20, 2015 CORRECTING ENTRY: DI# 195 filed in error. Deleted per the request of counsel. (kjk)
March 19, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mary Pat Thynge - Telephone Conference ( continuation of earlier teleconfernce today ) held on 3/19/2015; The court set a teleconference for 3/26/15 at 4:00 pm to be initiated by the defendant; The transcript shall serve as the order of the court. (Court Reporter Jennifer - Hawkins Reporting.) (kjk)
March 19, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mary Pat Thynge - Telephone Conference re: discovery dispute held on 3/19/2015; The transcript shall serve as the order of the court. (Court Reporter Taneyah Carroll - Hawkins Reporting.) (kjk)
March 17, 2015 Filing 194 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Gabriel Holloway re #193 Letter, by PhoneFactor Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)(Farnan, Michael) Modified on 3/18/2015 (nms).
March 17, 2015 Filing 193 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Mary Pat Thynge from Michael J. Farnan regarding Response to Plaintiff's March 16, 2015 Letter - re #191 Letter,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Certificate of Service)(Farnan, Michael)
March 17, 2015 Filing 192 Letter to The Honorable Mary Pat Thynge from Steven L. Caponi regarding Discovery Teleconference Additional Expert Information - re #191 Letter,. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Caponi, Steven)
March 16, 2015 Filing 191 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Mary Pat Thynge from Steven L. Caponi regarding Discovery Dispute and Teleconference. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Certificate of Service)(Caponi, Steven)
March 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER Denying #188 MOTION for Leave to File A Reply, filed by StrikeForce Technologies Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/13/2015. (nms)
March 13, 2015 Filing 189 7.1.1 STATEMENT re #188 MOTION for Leave to File A Reply, by StrikeForce Technologies Inc.. (Caponi, Steven) Modified on 3/13/2015 (nms).
March 13, 2015 Filing 188 MOTION for Leave to File A Reply to Response to Plaintiff's Objections to Report and Recommendation Regarding Claim Construction - filed by StrikeForce Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Reply, #2 Proposed Order).(Caponi, Steven) Modified on 3/13/2015 (nms).
March 13, 2015 Motions No Longer Referred: #188 MOTION for Leave to File A Reply to Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Objections to Report and Recommendation Regarding Claim Construction (nms)
March 10, 2015 Filing 187 Certification re Objections filed at D.I. #180 Pursuant to the Standing Order for Objections Filed Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 72. (Caponi, Steven) Modified on 3/10/2015 (nms).
March 9, 2015 Filing 186 RESPONSE TO #180 Objections, by PhoneFactor Inc.. (Farnan, Brian) Modified on 3/10/2015 (nms).
March 9, 2015 Filing 185 Joint STIPULATION and Order to Amend the Scheduling Order and Extend Expert Discovery Deadlines by StrikeForce Technologies Inc.. (Caponi, Steven)
March 9, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #185 Stipulation and Order to Amend the Scheduling Order and Extend Expert Discovery Deadlines. Expert discovery shall be commenced to be completed by June 2, 2015. For the party who has the burden of proof on the subject matter, the initial Federal Rule 26(a)(2)disclosure of expert testimony is due on or before April 3, 2015. Rebuttal expert reports on the same subject matter identified by another party are due on or before May 8, 2015. Supplementalreports (for e.g., secondary considerations of obviousness) are due May 26, 2015. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 3/9/15. (cak)
March 2, 2015 Filing 184 RESPONSE TO #178 Objections, by StrikeForce Technologies Inc.. (Caponi, Steven) Modified on 3/3/2015 (nms).
March 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER Setting Teleconference: Plaintiff's counsel to initiate the call. A Telephone Conference is set for 3/19/2015 at 1:30 PM EASTERN TIME before Judge Mary Pat Thynge to address discovery issues. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 3/2/15. (cak)
February 25, 2015 Filing 182 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Chandra Sekhar Surapaneni on March 11, 2015 filed by StrikeForce Technologies Inc..(Caponi, Steven)
February 20, 2015 Filing 181 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (i) PhoneFactor's Third Amended Preliminary Invalidity Contentions; (ii) Defendant PhoneFactor Inc.'s Supplemental Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Rule 26(a)(1) and the Default Standard for Discovery; and (iii) PhoneFactor, Inc.'s Objections and First Supplemental Responses to StrikeForce Technologies, Inc.'s First Set of Common Interrogatories filed by PhoneFactor Inc..(Farnan, Brian)
February 18, 2015 Filing 180 OBJECTIONS by StrikeForce Technologies Inc. to #168 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Caponi, Steven) Modified on 2/19/2015 (nms).
February 12, 2015 Filing 179 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff StrikeForce Technologies, Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Defendant Phonefactor, Inc.'s Request for Production to Ram Pemmaraju filed by StrikeForce Technologies Inc..(Caponi, Steven)
February 12, 2015 Filing 178 OBJECTIONS by PhoneFactor Inc. to #168 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Compliance)(Farnan, Michael) Modified on 2/12/2015 (nms).
February 9, 2015 Filing 177 NOTICE of Service to Plaintiff StrikeForce Technologies, inc.'s Objections and Responses to Defendant Phonefactors Inc.'s First Set of Requests for Admissions and Plaintiff's Answers to Defendant's First Set of Individual Interrogatories to Plaintiff by StrikeForce Technologies Inc.. (Caponi, Steven) Modified on 2/9/2015 (nms).
February 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORAL ORDER finding as moot #169 Motion to Quash Subpoena. Defendant withdrew subpoena. Ordered by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 2/4/15. (cak)
February 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORAL ORDER: The teleconference set for 2/10/15 at 1:00 PM EASTERN TIME with Judge Thynge is cancelled. Ordered by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 2/4/15. (cak)
February 3, 2015 Filing 174 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Subpoena to Peter Tawil by PhoneFactor Inc. (Farnan, Michael)
February 3, 2015 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Bill Harmon for PhoneFactor Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (dmp, )
February 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 173 SO ORDERED re #170 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Rule 26(e) Supplementations and Fact Discovery Deadline to February 20, 2015 and February 27, 2015, respectively. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 2/2/15. (cak)
February 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORAL ORDER re #169 MOTION to Quash filed by Peter S. Tawil: A teleconference has been scheduled for 2/10/15 at 1:00 PM EASTERN TIME with Judge Thynge to discuss this discovery issue. Counsel for PhoneFactor shall initiate the teleconference call and is to notify Mr. Tawil of this Order and is to include Mr. Tawil on the teleconference, as well as plaintiff. Defendants' response to the Motion shall be due on or before Thursday, 2/5/15, by no later than 1:00 PM and shall be in the form required in the Scheduling Order #50 Paragraph 4(i). Mr. Tawil shall have no other response. Ordered by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 2/2/15. (cak)
February 2, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #171 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Bill Harmon filed by PhoneFactor Inc. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 2/2/15. (cak)
January 30, 2015 Filing 171 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Bill Harmon - filed by PhoneFactor Inc.. Motions referred to Mary Pat Thynge.(Farnan, Michael)
January 30, 2015 Filing 170 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Rule 26(e) Supplementations and Fact Discovery Deadline to February 20, 2015 and February 27, 2015, respectively - filed by PhoneFactor Inc.. (Farnan, Michael)
January 29, 2015 Filing 169 MOTION to Quash D.I.#147 - NOTICE of Subpoena to Peter Tawil - filed by Peter S. Tawil. Motions referred to Mary Pat Thynge.(etg, )
January 29, 2015 Filing 168 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Please note that when filing Objections pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b)(2), briefing consists solely of the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages) and the Response to the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages). No further briefing shall be permitted with respect to objections without leave of the Court Objections to R&R due by 2/17/2015. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 1/29/15. (cak)
January 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORAL ORDER re #164 and #165 : The transcript of the teleconference held on 1/29/15 shall serve as the Order of the Court in this matter. Ordered by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 1/29/15. (cak)
January 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORAL ORDER re #163 Order Setting Teleconference: The teleconference set for 1/27/15 at 2:00 PM Eastern Time with Judge Thynge to discuss discovery issues has been RESCHEDULED to THURSDAY, JANUARY 29, 2015 AT 2:30 P.M. EASTERN TIME. There shall be no further submissions. Plaintiff's counsel shall initiate the teleconference call. Ordered by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 1/26/15. (cak)
January 22, 2015 Filing 165 Letter to The Honorable Mary Pat Thynge from Michael J. Farnan regarding Response to Strikeforce's January 21, 2015 Letter - re #164 Letter,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Farnan, Michael)
January 21, 2015 Filing 164 Letter to The Honorable Mary Pat Thynge from Steven L. Caponi regarding January 27, 2015 Teleconference - re #163 Order Setting Teleconference,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Caponi, Steven)
January 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER Setting Teleconference: Plaintiff's counsel to initiate the call. A Telephone Conference is set for 1/27/2015 at 2:00 PM EASTERN TIME before Judge Mary Pat Thynge to address a discovery issue. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 1/20/15. (cak)
January 16, 2015 Filing 162 NOTICE of Subpoena to Kent Krueger by PhoneFactor Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Farnan, Brian)
January 15, 2015 Filing 161 NOTICE OF SERVICE of PhoneFactor's Responses and Objections to Plaintiff StrikeForce's First Notice of Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition filed by PhoneFactor Inc..(Farnan, Brian)
January 14, 2015 Filing 160 NOTICE of Subpoenas to Telcordia Technologies, Inc. by PhoneFactor Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Farnan, Brian)
January 14, 2015 Filing 159 NOTICE of Subpoenas to Synergy Systems LLC by PhoneFactor Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Farnan, Brian)
January 14, 2015 Filing 158 NOTICE of Subpoenas to Steptoe & Johnson LLP by PhoneFactor Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Farnan, Brian)
January 14, 2015 Filing 157 NOTICE of Subpoenas to SoundView Research by PhoneFactor Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Farnan, Brian)
January 14, 2015 Filing 156 NOTICE of Subpoenas to Robert Denn by PhoneFactor Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Farnan, Brian)
January 14, 2015 Filing 155 NOTICE of Subpoenas to Ram Pemmaraju by PhoneFactor Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Farnan, Brian)
January 14, 2015 Filing 154 NOTICE of Subpoenas to PMI Technologies, Inc. by PhoneFactor Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Farnan, Brian)
January 14, 2015 Filing 153 NOTICE of Subpoenas to Lerner, David, Littenberg, Krumholtz & Mentlik, LLP by PhoneFactor Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Farnan, Brian)
January 14, 2015 Filing 152 NOTICE of Subpoenas to GreenHills Ventures LLC by PhoneFactor Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Farnan, Brian)
January 14, 2015 Filing 151 NOTICE of Subpoenas to Defense Technical Information Center (DTIC) by PhoneFactor Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Farnan, Brian)
January 14, 2015 Filing 150 NOTICE of Subpoenas to Computer Sciences Corporation by PhoneFactor Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Farnan, Brian)
January 14, 2015 Filing 149 NOTICE of Subpoenas to Bell Laboratories by PhoneFactor Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Farnan, Brian)
January 14, 2015 Filing 148 NOTICE of Subpoena to Steve Cooper by PhoneFactor Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Farnan, Brian)
January 14, 2015 Filing 147 NOTICE of Subpoena to Peter Tawil by PhoneFactor Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Farnan, Brian)
January 14, 2015 Filing 146 NOTICE of Subpoena to MRB Public Relations, Inc. by PhoneFactor Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Farnan, Brian)
January 14, 2015 Filing 145 NOTICE of Subpoena to Corporate Ink Public Relations, Ltd. by PhoneFactor Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Farnan, Brian)
January 14, 2015 Filing 144 NOTICE of Subpoena to Carl Krueger by PhoneFactor Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Farnan, Brian)
January 14, 2015 Filing 143 NOTICE of Subpoena to Brenda Eaden by PhoneFactor Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Farnan, Brian)
January 13, 2015 Filing 142 NOTICE OF SERVICE of PhoneFactor's First Set of Individual Interrogatories to Plaintiff filed by PhoneFactor Inc..(Farnan, Brian)
January 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 141 SO ORDERED, re #136 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Plaintiff to file its reply brief in support of its Motion for Leave to Amend its Complaint (D.I. 125) to January 5, 2015 filed by StrikeForce Technologies Inc.. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 1/8/15. (kjk)
January 8, 2015 Filing 140 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant PhoneFactor Inc.'s First Set of Requests for Admission to Plaintiff StrikeForce Technologies, Inc. filed by PhoneFactor Inc..(Farnan, Brian)
January 5, 2015 Filing 139 REDACTED VERSION of #134 Declaration of Mary Jane Peal, by PhoneFactor Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-I)(Farnan, Brian) Modified on 1/6/2015 (nms).
January 5, 2015 Filing 138 REDACTED VERSION of #133 Answering Brief in Opposition, by PhoneFactor Inc.. (Farnan, Brian)
January 5, 2015 Filing 137 REPLY BRIEF re #125 MOTION to Amend Complaint, filed by StrikeForce Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Caponi, Steven) Modified on 1/5/2015 (nms).
January 5, 2015 REDACTION NOTICE: In accordance with section G of the Administrative Procedures Governing Filing and Service by Electronic Means, redacted versions of sealed documents shall be filed electronically within 7 days of the filing of the sealed document. The records of this case do not reflect the filing of a redacted version of DI #133 . (nms)
January 5, 2015 REDACTION NOTICE: In accordance with section G of the Administrative Procedures Governing Filing and Service by Electronic Means, redacted versions of sealed documents shall be filed electronically within 7 days of the filing of the sealed document. The records of this case do not reflect the filing of a redacted version of DI #134 . (nms)
December 23, 2014 Filing 136 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Plaintiff to file its reply brief in support of its Motion for Leave to Amend its Complaint (D.I. 125) to January 5, 2015 - filed by StrikeForce Technologies Inc.. (Caponi, Steven)
December 19, 2014 Filing 135 STIPULATION to Amend Scheduling Order by PhoneFactor Inc.. (Farnan, Brian)
December 19, 2014 Filing 134 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Mary Jane Peal re #133 Answering Brief in Opposition, by PhoneFactor Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Certificate of Service)(Farnan, Brian) Modified on 12/19/2014 (nms).
December 19, 2014 Filing 133 [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #125 MOTION For Leave to Join Microsoft Corporation and Amend its Complaint to Assert Claims Against Microsoft, filed by PhoneFactor Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 1/5/2015. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Farnan, Brian) Modified on 12/19/2014 (nms).
December 9, 2014 Filing 132 NOTICE to Take Deposition of StrikeForce Technologies, Inc. on 12/16/2014 filed by PhoneFactor Inc..(Farnan, Brian)
December 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 131 SO ORDERED Granting #130 Stipulation of Dismissal, filed by StrikeForce Technologies Inc. (First Midwest Bancorp Inc. terminated). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/4/2014. (nms)
December 4, 2014 Filing 130 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Defendant First Midwest Bancorp, Inc. Only by StrikeForce Technologies Inc.. (Caponi, Steven)
December 3, 2014 Filing 129 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoena to Microsoft Corporation filed by StrikeForce Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Caponi, Steven)
December 1, 2014 Filing 128 NOTICE to Take Deposition of PhoneFactor, Inc. Representative on December 18, 2014 filed by StrikeForce Technologies Inc..(Caponi, Steven)
November 25, 2014 Filing 127 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants to respond to Plaintiff StrikeForce Technologies, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Amend its Complaint to Assert Claims Against Microsoft Corporation to 12/19/2014 - filed by PhoneFactor Inc.. (Farnan, Brian)
November 25, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #127 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants to respond to Plaintiff StrikeForce Technologies, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Amend its Complaint to Assert Claims Against Microsoft Corporation to 12/19/2014 filed by PhoneFactor Inc. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 11/25/14. (cak)
November 25, 2014 Set Briefing Schedule: Per DI 127, Answering Brief on Plaintiff's MOTION to Amend/Correct #125 is now due 12/19/2014. (cak)
November 21, 2014 Filing 126 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #125 MOTION For Leave To Amend Complaint, filed by StrikeForce Technologies Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 12/8/2014. (Caponi, Steven) Modified on 11/25/2014 (nms).
November 21, 2014 Filing 125 MOTION For Leave To Amend Complaint - filed by StrikeForce Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Proposed Order, #4 7.1.1 Statement)Motions referred to Mary Pat Thynge.(Caponi, Steven) Modified on 11/25/2014 (nms).
November 21, 2014 Filing 124 REDACTED VERSION of #116 Statement by StrikeForce Technologies Inc.. (Caponi, Steven)
November 21, 2014 Filing 123 Official Transcript of Markman Hearing held on 11-19-14 before Judge Mary Pat Thynge. Court Reporter/Transcriber Taneha Carroll. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/12/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/22/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/19/2015. (lad)
November 21, 2014 Filing 122 REDACTED VERSION of #115 Statement by PhoneFactor Inc.. (Farnan, Brian)
November 19, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mary Pat Thynge - Markman Hearing held on 11/19/2014. (Court Reporter Taneyah Carroll ( Hawkins Reporting ).) (kjk)
November 13, 2014 Filing 121 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Sunita Pemmaraju on 12/5/2014 filed by PhoneFactor Inc..(Farnan, Brian)
November 13, 2014 Filing 120 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Robert Denn on 12/3/2014 filed by PhoneFactor Inc..(Farnan, Brian)
November 13, 2014 Filing 119 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Ram Pemmaraju on 12/10/2014 filed by PhoneFactor Inc..(Farnan, Brian)
November 13, 2014 Filing 118 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Mark Kay on 12/4/2014 filed by PhoneFactor Inc..(Farnan, Brian)
November 13, 2014 Filing 117 NOTICE to Take Deposition of George Waller on 12/11/2014 filed by PhoneFactor Inc..(Farnan, Brian)
November 11, 2014 Filing 116 [SEALED] Comments on PhoneFactor's Technical Tutorial, by StrikeForce Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Caponi, Steven) Modified on 11/12/2014 (nms).
November 10, 2014 Filing 115 [SEALED] Comments on StrikeForce's Technical Tutorial, by PhoneFactor Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Farnan, Brian) Modified on 11/12/2014 (nms).
November 7, 2014 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Charles R. Wolfe, Jr for StrikeForce Technologies Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mas)
November 6, 2014 Filing 114 Joint Claim Construction Brief filed by StrikeForce Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit 1 to Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit 2 to Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit 3 to Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit 4 to Exhibit B, #7 Exhibit 5 to Exhibit B, #8 Exhibit 6 to Exhibit B, #9 Exhibit 7 to Exhibit B, #10 Exhibit 8 to Exhibit B, #11 Exhibit 9 to Exhibit B, #12 Exhibit 10 to Exhibit B, #13 Exhibit 11 to Exhibit B, #14 Exhibit 12 to Exhibit B, #15 Exhibit 13 to Exhibit B, #16 Exhibit 14 to Exhibit B, #17 Exhibit 15 to Exhibit B, #18 Exhibit 16 to Exhibit B, #19 Exhibit 17 to Exhibit B, #20 Exhibit 18 to Exhibit B)(Caponi, Steven) Modified on 11/7/2014 (nms).
November 6, 2014 Filing 113 Amended Joint Claim Construction Chart, by StrikeForce Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T, #22 Exhibit U, #23 Exhibit V, #24 Exhibit W, #25 Exhibit X, #26 Exhibit Y, #27 Exhibit Z, #28 Exhibit AA, #29 Exhibit BB)(Caponi, Steven) Modified on 11/6/2014 (nms).
November 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 112 SO ORDERED granting #109 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Ameya V. Paradkar, Esquire of Blank Rome to represent plaintiff StrikeForce. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 11/6/14. (cak)
November 6, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED granting #109 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Charles R. Wolfe, Jr., Esquire of Blank Rome to represent plaintiff StrikeForce. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 11/6/14. (cak)
November 6, 2014 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Ameya Paradkar for StrikeForce Technologies Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (dmp, )
November 5, 2014 Filing 111 NOTICE of Subpoena to E. L. Mont by PhoneFactor Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Farnan, Brian)
November 5, 2014 Filing 110 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Charles R. Wolfe, Jr. - filed by StrikeForce Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Counsel, #2 Text of Proposed Order)Motions referred to Mary Pat Thynge.(Caponi, Steven)
November 4, 2014 Filing 109 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Ameya V. Paradkar - filed by StrikeForce Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certification of Counsel)Motions referred to Mary Pat Thynge.(Caponi, Steven)
November 4, 2014 Filing 108 NOTICE of filing the following Non-Paper material(s) in multi media format: StrikeForce Technologies, Inc.s Technology Tutorial. Original Non-paper material(s) to be filed with the Clerk's Office. Notice filed by Steven L. Caponi on behalf of StrikeForce Technologies Inc. (Caponi, Steven)
November 4, 2014 Filing 107 NOTICE of filing the following Non-Paper material(s) in multi media format: two discs containing Defendant PhoneFactor Inc.'s Technology Tutorial. Original Non-paper material(s) to be filed with the Clerk's Office. Notice filed by Brian E. Farnan on behalf of PhoneFactor Inc. (Farnan, Brian)
November 3, 2014 Filing 106 NOTICE of Joinder in PhoneFactor's Surreply Markman Brief by First Midwest Bancorp Inc. (Matterer, Mary)
October 21, 2014 Filing 105 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Alan T. Sherman on 10/28/2014 filed by PhoneFactor Inc..(Farnan, Brian)
October 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORAL ORDER re #103 Joint Status Report. In light of the information contained in the Joint Status report, unless the parties request to have a status teleconference, the status teleconference with Judge Thynge scheduled for 10/24/14 at 9:00 AM Eastern Time is cancelled. If the parties request to have the status teleconference, it can be rescheduled at a later date. Ordered by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 10/20/14. (cak)
October 17, 2014 Filing 103 Joint STATUS REPORT by StrikeForce Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Caponi, Steven)
October 16, 2014 Filing 102 NOTICE of Subpoenas to The Capital Corporation by PhoneFactor Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Farnan, Brian)
October 16, 2014 Filing 101 NOTICE of Subpoenas to General Patent Corporation by PhoneFactor Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Farnan, Brian)
October 16, 2014 Filing 100 NOTICE of Subpoenas to Marvin L. Davis by PhoneFactor Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Farnan, Brian)
October 13, 2014 Filing 99 NOTICE OF SERVICE of StrikeForce Technologies, Inc.'s Answers to Defendants' First Set of Common Interrogatories and Verification filed by StrikeForce Technologies Inc..(Caponi, Steven)
October 7, 2014 Filing 98 NOTICE OF SERVICE of StrikeForce Technologies, Inc.'s Responses to PhoneFactor's First Set of Requests for Production filed by StrikeForce Technologies Inc..(Caponi, Steven)
October 6, 2014 Filing 97 NOTICE of Joinder in PhoneFactor, Inc.'s Opening Claim Construction Brief by First Midwest Bancorp Inc. (Matterer, Mary)
September 25, 2014 Filing 96 NOTICE of Subpoenas to Laurence J. Fromm by PhoneFactor Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Farnan, Brian)
September 25, 2014 Filing 95 NOTICE of Subpoena to Authentify Inc. by PhoneFactor Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Farnan, Brian)
September 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORAL ORDER re #89 MOTION for Teleconference to Resolve Discovery Dispute. The transcript of the 9/25/14 teleconference with Judge Thynge shall serve as the order of the Court in this matter. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 9/25/14. (cak)
September 25, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mary Pat Thynge - Telephone Conference held on 9/25/2014. (Court Reporter Taneah Carroll - Hawkins Reporting.) (cak)
September 23, 2014 Filing 93 Letter to The Honorable Mary Pat Thynge from Chief Magistrate Thynge regarding discovery dispute. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Caponi, Steven) Modified on 9/24/2014 (nms).
September 22, 2014 Filing 92 Letter to The Honorable Mary Pat Thynge from Brian E. Farnan regarding Discovery Dispute. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Farnan, Brian)
September 18, 2014 Filing 91 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Erin Brechtelsbauer - filed by First Midwest Bancorp Inc.. Motions referred to Mary Pat Thynge.(Matterer, Mary)
September 18, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED granting #91 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Erin Brechtelsbauer of BakerHostetler to represent Defendant First Midwest Bancorp, Inc. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 9/18/14. (cak)
September 18, 2014 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Mary Jane Peal for PhoneFactor Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (dmp, )
September 18, 2014 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Andrew C. Cooper for PhoneFactor Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (dmp, )
September 17, 2014 Filing 90 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Mary Jane Peal and Andrew C. Cooper - filed by PhoneFactor Inc.. Motions referred to Mary Pat Thynge.(Farnan, Brian)
September 17, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED granting #90 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Mary Jane Peal and Andrew C. Cooper to represent Defendant PhoneFactor in this matter. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 9/17/14. (cak)
September 16, 2014 Filing 89 MOTION for Teleconference to Resolve Discovery Dispute - filed by PhoneFactor Inc.. Motions referred to Mary Pat Thynge.(Farnan, Brian)
September 16, 2014 Filing 88 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Opening Claim Construction Brief filed by StrikeForce Technologies Inc..(Caponi, Steven)
September 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER Setting Teleconference: Michael J. Farnan, Esquire to initiate the call. A Telephone Conference is set for 9/25/2014 at 10:00 AM EASTERN TIME before Judge Mary Pat Thynge to address a discovery matter. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 9/16/14. (cak)
September 8, 2014 Filing 86 Joint CLAIM Construction Chart, by StrikeForce Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit A to Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit B to Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit C to Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit D to Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit E to Exhibit 1, #7 Exhibit F to Exhibit 1, #8 Exhibit G to Exhibit 1, #9 Exhibit H to Exhibit 1, #10 Exhibit I to Exhibit 1, #11 Exhibit J to Exhibit 1, #12 Exhibit K to Exhibit 1, #13 Exhibit L to Exhibit 1, #14 Exhibit M to Exhibit 1, #15 Exhibit N to Exhibit 1, #16 Exhibit O to Exhibit 1, #17 Exhibit P to Exhibit 1, #18 Exhibit Q to Exhibit 1, #19 Exhibit R to Exhibit 1, #20 Exhibit S to Exhibit 1, #21 Exhibit T to Exhibit 1, #22 Exhibit U to Exhibit 1, #23 Exhibit V to Exhibit 1, #24 Exhibit W to Exhibit 1, #25 Exhibit X to Exhibit 1, #26 Exhibit Y to Exhibit 1, #27 Exhibit Z to Exhibit 1)(Caponi, Steven) Modified on 9/9/2014 (nms).
September 2, 2014 Filing 85 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (i) PhoneFactor Inc.'s Objections and Responses to StrikeForce Technologies, Inc.'s First Set of Common Requests for Production and (ii) PhoneFactor Inc.'s Objections and Responses to StrikeForce Technologies, Inc.'s First Set of Common Interrogatories filed by PhoneFactor Inc..(Farnan, Brian)
August 28, 2014 Filing 84 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Answers to Common Interrogatories and Response to StrikeForce's Second Set of Requests for Production filed by First Midwest Bancorp Inc..(Matterer, Mary)
August 26, 2014 Filing 83 NOTICE OF SERVICE of PhoneFactor's Amended Preliminary Invalidity Contentions filed by PhoneFactor Inc..(Farnan, Brian)
August 21, 2014 Filing 82 NOTICE OF SERVICE of StrikeForce Technologies, Inc.'s Proposed Initial Construction Claim Terms filed by StrikeForce Technologies Inc..(Caponi, Steven)
August 15, 2014 Filing 81 ANSWER to #68 Second Amended Complaint, by First Midwest Bancorp Inc..(Matterer, Mary) Modified on 8/15/2014 (nms).
August 14, 2014 Filing 80 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (i) Phonefactor's First Set of Requests for Production and (ii) Defendants' First Set of Common Interrogatories to Plaintiff filed by PhoneFactor Inc..(Farnan, Brian)
August 14, 2014 Filing 79 NOTICE of Subpoenas to Intel Corporation by PhoneFactor Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Farnan, Brian)
August 14, 2014 Filing 78 NOTICE of Subpoenas to Ericsson Inc. by PhoneFactor Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Farnan, Brian)
August 14, 2014 Filing 77 NOTICE of Subpoenas to Dialogic Inc. by PhoneFactor Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Farnan, Brian)
August 14, 2014 Filing 76 NOTICE of Subpoenas to Authentify Patent Company, LLC by PhoneFactor Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Farnan, Brian)
August 14, 2014 Filing 75 NOTICE of Subpoenas to American Telephone & Telegraph Company by PhoneFactor Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Farnan, Brian)
August 14, 2014 Filing 74 NOTICE of Subpoenas to Dr. Michael Lutz by PhoneFactor Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Farnan, Brian)
August 14, 2014 Filing 73 NOTICE of Subpoenas to Dr. Hank Magnuski by PhoneFactor Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Farnan, Brian)
August 1, 2014 Filing 72 ANSWER to #68 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIMS against StrikeForce Technologies Inc. by PhoneFactor Inc..(Farnan, Brian) Modified on 8/4/2014 (nms).
July 30, 2014 Filing 71 NOTICE OF SERVICE of PhoneFactor's Preliminary Invalidity Contentions filed by PhoneFactor Inc..(Farnan, Brian)
July 29, 2014 Filing 70 NOTICE OF SERVICE of StrikeForce Technologies, Inc.'s Requests for Production and First Set of Common Interrogatories to Defendants filed by StrikeForce Technologies Inc..(Caponi, Steven)
July 29, 2014 Filing 69 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Respond to Second Amended Complaint to August 15, 2014 - filed by First Midwest Bancorp Inc.. (Matterer, Mary)
July 29, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #69 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Respond to Second Amended Complaint to August 15, 2014 filed by First Midwest Bancorp Inc. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 7/29/14. (cak)
July 8, 2014 Filing 68 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT For Patent Infringement against First Midwest Bancorp Inc., and PhoneFactor Inc.- filed by StrikeForce Technologies Inc..(nms)
July 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 67 SO ORDERED Granting #66 Stipulation to File Second Amended Complaint, filed by StrikeForce Technologies Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/8/2014. (nms)
July 2, 2014 Filing 66 STIPULATION To File a Second Amended Complaint, by StrikeForce Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Second Amended Complaint)(Caponi, Steven) Modified on 7/2/2014 (nms).
April 14, 2014 Filing 65 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Answers to First Set of Interrogatories and Response to Plaintiff's First Request for Production filed by First Midwest Bancorp Inc..(Matterer, Mary)
March 31, 2014 Filing 64 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Core Technical Documents filed by PhoneFactor Inc..(Farnan, Brian)
March 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 63 SO ORDERED granting #62 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 3/27/14. (cak)
March 26, 2014 Filing 62 Proposed Stipulated Protective Order - filed by StrikeForce Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Motions referred to Mary Pat Thynge.(Caponi, Steven) Modified on 3/27/2014 (nms).
March 26, 2014 Filing 61 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoena (First Midwest Bank) filed by StrikeForce Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Caponi, Steven)
March 25, 2014 Filing 60 Letter to The Honorable Mary Pat Thynge from Steven L. Caponi regarding Request Extension of Time for Parties to Submit Draft Stipulated Protective Order Until March 26, 2014. (Caponi, Steven)
March 17, 2014 Filing 59 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Law Firm by First Midwest Bancorp Inc. (Matterer, Mary)
March 14, 2014 Filing 58 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant PhoneFactor Inc.'s Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Rule 26(a)(1) and the Default Standard for Discovery filed by PhoneFactor Inc..(Farnan, Brian)
March 14, 2014 Filing 57 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures filed by StrikeForce Technologies Inc..(Caponi, Steven)
March 14, 2014 Filing 56 NOTICE OF SERVICE of StrikeForce Technologies, Inc.'s First Request for Production of Documents to First Midwest Bancorp, Inc. filed by StrikeForce Technologies Inc..(Caponi, Steven)
March 14, 2014 Filing 55 NOTICE OF SERVICE of StrikeForce Technologies, Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories to First Midwest Bancorp, Inc. filed by StrikeForce Technologies Inc..(Caponi, Steven)
March 14, 2014 Filing 54 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures filed by First Midwest Bancorp Inc..(Matterer, Mary)
February 24, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #53 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to submit proposed Protective Order to March 24, 2014 filed by PhoneFactor Inc. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 2/24/14. (cak)
February 21, 2014 Filing 53 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to submit proposed Protective Order to March 24, 2014 - filed by PhoneFactor Inc.. (Farnan, Brian)
February 21, 2014 Filing 52 NOTICE OF SERVICE of StrikeForce Technologies, Inc.'s Disclosure of Asserted Patents and List of Accused First Midwest Bancorp Inc. Products re #50 Scheduling Order,,, filed by StrikeForce Technologies Inc..(Caponi, Steven)
February 21, 2014 Filing 51 NOTICE OF SERVICE of StrikeForce Technologies, Inc.'s Disclosure of Asserted Patents and List of Accused PhoneFactor Inc. Products re #50 Scheduling Order,,, filed by StrikeForce Technologies Inc..(Caponi, Steven)
February 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 50 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case referred to the Magistrate Judge Thynge for the purpose of exploring ADR. Joinder of Parties due by 11/21/2014. Amended Pleadings due by 11/21/2014. Discovery due by 1/30/2015. A Status Conference is set for 10/24/2001 at 09:30 AM before Judge Mary Pat Thynge Status Report due by 10/17/2014. Dispositive Motions due by 7/2/2015. Claim Construction Opening Brief due by 9/15/2014. Claim Construction Answering Brief due by 10/6/2014. Claim Construction Reply Brief due by 10/20/2014. Claim Construction Surreply Brief due by 11/3/2014. A Markman Hearing is set for 11/19/2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2B before Judge Mary Pat Thynge. A Final Pretrial Conference is set for 2/9/2016 at 09:30 AM in Chambers before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 2/2/2016. A 5-day Jury Trial is set for 2/22/2016 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 2/12/14. (cak)
February 7, 2014 Filing 49 PROPOSED Scheduling Order, by StrikeForce Technologies Inc.. (Caponi, Steven) Modified on 2/7/2014 (nms).
January 30, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mary Pat Thynge - Scheduling Conference held on 1/30/2014; Counsel will file and updated proposed scheduling order and and ADR Notification Letter by 2/6/14. (Court Reporter Taneah Carroll - Hawkins Reporting.) (kjk)
January 24, 2014 Filing 48 PROPOSED Scheduling Order - filed by StrikeForce Technologies Inc.. (Caponi, Steven)
January 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Order Setting Telephonic Scheduling Conference: A Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for 1/29/2014 at 1:00 PM EASTERN TIME before Judge Mary Pat Thynge. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 1/17/14. (Attachments: #1 Draft Scheduling Order)(cak)
January 16, 2014 Filing 46 ANSWER to #34 Amended Complaint, by First Midwest Bancorp Inc..(Matterer, Mary) Modified on 1/21/2014 (nms).
December 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER Overruling #42 Objections; ADOPTING the REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS(D.I. #41 ). The Motion to Dismiss (D.I. #31 ) is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/30/2013. (nms)
December 19, 2013 Filing 44 RESPONSE TO OBJECTIONS by StrikeForce Technologies Inc. re #42 Objections. (Caponi, Steven) Modified on 12/20/2013 (nms).
December 19, 2013 CORRECTING ENTRY: The Response filed at D.I. 44 was inadvertently removed from the docket. Counsel is asked to please re-file the response. (nms)
December 3, 2013 Filing 43 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Mary B. Matterer regarding enclosing courtesy copies of documents related to objections to report and recommendation. (Matterer, Mary)
December 2, 2013 Filing 42 OBJECTIONS by First Midwest Bancorp Inc. to #41 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #40 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #31 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by First Midwest Bancorp Inc.. Please note that when filing Objections pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedur . (Matterer, Mary)
November 14, 2013 Filing 41 AMENDED REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #31 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by First Midwest Bancorp Inc.. Please note that when filing Objections pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b)(2), briefing consists solely. Please note that when filing Objections pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b)(2), briefing consists solely of the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages) and the Response to the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages). No further briefing shall be permitted with respect to objections without leave of the Court. Objections to R&R due by 12/2/2013. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 11/14/13. (cak)
November 14, 2013 CORRECTING ENTRY: The Report and Recommendation filed at DI 40 is amended to correct some typographical errors. The Amended Report and Recommendation is filed at DI 41. (cak)
November 13, 2013 Filing 40 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #31 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by First Midwest Bancorp Inc.. Please note that when filing Objections pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b)(2), briefing consists solely of the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages) and the Response to the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages). No further briefing shall be permitted with respect to objections without leave of the Court. Objections to R&R due by 12/2/2013. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 11/13/13. (cak)
September 9, 2013 Filing 39 REPLY BRIEF re #31 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by First Midwest Bancorp Inc.. (Matterer, Mary)
August 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER finding as moot #17 Motion to Dismiss. First Midwest Bancorp, Inc.s motion to dismiss on the complaint (D.I. 17) has been rendered moot by the filing of StrikeForces amended complaint, and First Midwest Bancorp, Inc.s response thereto. Only its motion to dismiss regarding the amended complaint (D.I. 31) will be addressed. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 8/23/13. (cak)
August 23, 2013 Filing 37 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to File Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint to September 9, 2013 - filed by First Midwest Bancorp Inc., StrikeForce Technologies Inc.. (Matterer, Mary)
August 23, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #37 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to File Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint to September 9, 2013 filed by First Midwest Bancorp Inc., StrikeForce Technologies Inc. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 8/23/13. (cak)
August 22, 2013 Filing 36 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #31 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by StrikeForce Technologies Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 9/3/2013. (Caponi, Steven)
August 22, 2013 Filing 35 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney Peter S. Weissman by StrikeForce Technologies Inc. (Caponi, Steven)
August 6, 2013 CORRECTING ENTRY: D.I. 34 has been added to the docket per the So Ordering of D.I. #30 . A link to D.I. 34 has been added to the Answer filed at D.I. #33 . (nms)
August 5, 2013 Filing 33 ANSWER to #34 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand, by PhoneFactor Inc..(Farnan, Brian) Modified on 8/6/2013 (nms).
August 5, 2013 Filing 32 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #31 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by First Midwest Bancorp Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 8/22/2013. (Matterer, Mary)
August 5, 2013 Filing 31 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by First Midwest Bancorp Inc.. Motions referred to Mary Pat Thynge.(Matterer, Mary)
June 25, 2013 Filing 34 AMENDED COMPLAINT For Patent Infringement against First Midwest Bancorp Inc., PhoneFactor Inc.- filed by StrikeForce Technologies Inc..(nms)
June 25, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #30 Stipulation to File Amended Complaint filed by StrikeForce Technologies Inc. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 6/25/13. (cak)
June 24, 2013 Filing 30 STIPULATION for the Filing of a First Amended Complaint by StrikeForce Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Caponi, Steven)
June 21, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED granting #29 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Craig M. White of Edwards Wildman Palmer to represent Defendant First Midwest Bancorp, Inc. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 6/21/13. (cak)
June 21, 2013 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Craig M. White for First Midwest Bancorp Inc. added for electronic noticing. (dmp, )
June 20, 2013 Filing 29 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Craig M. White - filed by First Midwest Bancorp Inc.. Motions referred to Mary Pat Thynge.(Matterer, Mary)
June 18, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #28 Stipulation filed by StrikeForce Technologies Inc.: First Midwest Bancorp does not oppose filing of the Amended Complaint. First Midwest Bancorp agrees to hold in abeyance, without prejudice, such that StrikeForce need not file an opposition to the pending Motion to Dismiss prior to the filing of the Amended Complaint. First Midwest Bancorp has forty (40) days from the filing of StrikeForce's Amended Complaint to file an Answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint, including but not limited to re-urging the Motion to Dismiss either in its current form or as amended. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 6/18/13. (cak)
June 17, 2013 Filing 28 STIPULATION Regarding Opposition to Motion to Dismiss re #17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) by StrikeForce Technologies Inc.. (Caponi, Steven)
June 11, 2013 Filing 27 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by StrikeForce Technologies Inc. as to Fiserv Inc. (Caponi, Steven)
June 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 26 SO ORDERED re #25 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME To Respond to Defendant First Midwest Bancorp's Motion to Dismiss to June 17, 2013 filed by StrikeForce Technologies Inc. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 6/10/13. (cak)
June 7, 2013 Filing 25 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME To Respond to Defendant First Midwest Bancorp's Motion to Dismiss to June 17, 2013 - filed by StrikeForce Technologies Inc.. (Caponi, Steven)
May 28, 2013 Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Fiserv Inc. answer due 6/11/2013. (cak)
May 28, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #24 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move or otherwise respond to Complaint to June 11, 2013 filed by StrikeForce Technologies Inc. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 5/28/13. (cak)
May 24, 2013 Filing 24 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move or otherwise respond to Complaint to June 11, 2013 - filed by StrikeForce Technologies Inc.. (Caponi, Steven)
May 20, 2013 Pro Hac Vice Attorney John D. Garretson for PhoneFactor Inc. added for electronic noticing. (els)
May 16, 2013 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Patrick A. Lujin,Jesse J. Camacho for PhoneFactor Inc. added for electronic noticing. (dmp, )
May 15, 2013 Case Reassigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
May 15, 2013 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Mary Pat Thynge: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above captioned case is referred to Magistrate Judge Mary Pat Thynge to hear and resolve all pretrial matters, up to and including the resolution of case-dispositive motions, subject to 28 U.S.C. 636(b) and any further Order of the Court; all subsequent filings in this action shall be captioned as follows: Civil Action No. 13-490-RGA-MPT. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/15/2013. Motions referred to Mary Pat Thynge.(nms)
May 14, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #23 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Fiserv, Inc. to Answer Complaint to May 28, 2013 filed by StrikeForce Technologies Inc. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 5/14/13. (cak)
May 14, 2013 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #22 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of John D. Garretson, Jesse J. Camacho, and Patrick A. Lujin to represent Defendant PhoneFactor, Inc. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 5/14/13. (cak)
May 14, 2013 Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Fiserv Inc. answer now due 5/28/2013. (cak)
May 13, 2013 Filing 23 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer Complaint to May 28, 2013 - filed by StrikeForce Technologies Inc.. (Caponi, Steven)
May 13, 2013 Filing 22 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John D. Garretson, Jesse J. Camacho, and Patrick A. Lujin - filed by PhoneFactor Inc.. (Farnan, Brian)
May 13, 2013 Filing 21 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by PhoneFactor Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Microsoft Corporation for PhoneFactor Inc... (Farnan, Brian)
May 13, 2013 Filing 20 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by PhoneFactor Inc..(Farnan, Brian)
May 10, 2013 Filing 19 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by First Midwest Bancorp Inc.. (Matterer, Mary)
May 10, 2013 Filing 18 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by First Midwest Bancorp Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 5/28/2013. (Matterer, Mary)
May 10, 2013 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) - filed by First Midwest Bancorp Inc.. (Matterer, Mary)
April 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SO ORDERED re #15 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant Fiserv, Inc. to answer Plaintiff's Complaint to May 13, 2013 filed by StrikeForce Technologies Inc. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 4/22/13. (cak)
April 22, 2013 Filing 15 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant Fiserv, Inc. to answer Plaintiff's Complaint to May 13, 2013 - filed by StrikeForce Technologies Inc.. (Caponi, Steven)
April 22, 2013 Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Fiserv Inc. answer now due 5/13/2013 per DI 15. (cak)
April 19, 2013 Filing 14 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant First Midwest Bancorp, Inc. to answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint to May 13, 2013 - filed by StrikeForce Technologies Inc.. (Caponi, Steven)
April 19, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #14 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant First Midwest Bancorp, Inc. to answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint to May 13, 2013 filed by StrikeForce Technologies Inc. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 4/19/13. (cak)
April 19, 2013 Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: per DI 14 First Midwest Bancorp Inc. answer now due 5/13/2013. (cak)
April 17, 2013 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on PhoneFactor, Inc. on April 1, 2013, filed by StrikeForce Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Caponi, Steven)
April 16, 2013 Filing 12 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond To Complaint to May 13, 2013 - filed by StrikeForce Technologies Inc.. (Caponi, Steven)
April 16, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #12 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond To Complaint to May 13, 2013 filed by StrikeForce Technologies Inc. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 4/16/13. (cak)
April 16, 2013 Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: PhoneFactor Inc. answer due 5/13/2013. (cak)
April 9, 2013 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Fiserv, Inc. c/o CSC Lawyers Incorporating Service on April 1, 2013, filed by StrikeForce Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Caponi, Steven)
April 9, 2013 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Fiserv, Inc. on April 2, 2013, filed by StrikeForce Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Caponi, Steven)
April 9, 2013 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on First Midwest Bancorp, Inc. on April 1, 2013, filed by StrikeForce Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Caponi, Steven)
April 5, 2013 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Paul Honigberg,Peter S. Weissman for StrikeForce Technologies Inc. added for electronic noticing. (els)
April 3, 2013 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on First Midwest Bancorp. Inc. on March 29, 2013, filed by StrikeForce Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Caponi, Steven)
April 3, 2013 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on PhoneFactor, Inc. on March 29, 2013, filed by StrikeForce Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Caponi, Steven)
April 3, 2013 Case Assigned to Judge Mary Pat Thynge. Please include the initials of the Judge (MPT) after the case number on all documents filed. This case has been randomly selected for direct assignment to a Magistrate Judge. If all parties consent to the case proceeding before a Magistrate Judge, they should submit Form AO 85 (Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge), signed by all parties or their attorneys, within sixty (60) days; that is, on or before 6/3/2013. All parties have a right to proceed before a District Judge. Accordingly, this case will be randomly reassigned to a District Judge upon the earlier of: (a) the filing of a case-dispositive motion (e.g., motion to dismiss, motion for judgment on the pleadings, or motion for summary judgment) or (b) the expiration of sixty (60) days without the filing of a signed copy of Form AO 85. No request to extend the sixty day period shall be filed. More information on the Court`s Pilot Program on direct assignment of cases to Magistrate Judges is available in the Court`s Standing Order, dated November 3, 2011, available on the Court`s website. (rjb)
April 3, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Peter S. Weissman, Esquire to reprsent plaintiff StrikeForce. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 4/3/13. (cak)
April 3, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Paul M. Honigberg, Esquire to represent plaintiff StrikeForce Technologies. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 4/3/13. (cak)
April 1, 2013 Filing 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Paul M. Honigberg - filed by StrikeForce Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certification)(Caponi, Steven)
April 1, 2013 Filing 5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Peter S. Weissman - filed by StrikeForce Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certification)(Caponi, Steven)
March 29, 2013 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by StrikeForce Technologies Inc.. (Caponi, Steven)
March 28, 2013 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) U.S. 7,870,599 B2;. (mdb)
March 28, 2013 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction (mdb)
March 28, 2013 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - filed with Jury Demand against First Midwest Bancorp Inc., Fiserv Inc., PhoneFactor Inc. Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0311-1258287.) - filed by StrikeForce Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(mdb)
March 28, 2013 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to First Midwest Bancorp Inc. on 3/28/2013; Fiserv Inc. on 3/28/2013; PhoneFactor Inc. on 3/28/2013. (mdb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: StrikeForce Technologies Inc. v. PhoneFactor Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Midwest Bancorp Inc.
Represented By: Mary Matterer
Represented By: Craig M. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PhoneFactor Inc.
Represented By: Andrew C. Cooper
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Mary Jane Peal
Represented By: Patrick A. Lujin
Represented By: John D. Garretson
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Bill Harmon
Represented By: Jesse J. Camacho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fiserv Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Peter S. Tawil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: StrikeForce Technologies Inc.
Represented By: Peter S. Weissman
Represented By: Ameya Paradkar
Represented By: Steven L. Caponi
Represented By: Paul Honigberg
Represented By: Charles R. Wolfe, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?