Brokenbrough v. Capitol Uniform and Linen

Plaintiff: Raymond J. Brokenbrough, Jr.
Defendant: Capitol Uniform and Linen
Case Number: 1:2013cv00692
Filed: April 17, 2013
Court: Delaware District Court
Office: Wilmington Office
County: Kent
Presiding Judge: Leonard P. Stark
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 6, 2014 16 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER DENYING D.I. 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficiency of Service of Process filed by Capitol Cleaners & Launderers Inc., GRANTING D.I. 15 MOTION to Quash Service of Process filed by Capitol Cleaners & Launderers Inc., and ordering that Plaintiff be afforded an additional 30 days - until February 5, 2014 - to properly effectuate service on Defendant.. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 01/06/2014. (mlc)
March 12, 2014 20 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER DENYING D.I. 19 MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficiency of Service of Process filed by Capitol Cleaners & Launderers Inc., GRANTING D.I. 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Defendant filed by Raymond J. Brokenbrough, Jr., and ordering that Plaintiff be afforded an additional 30 days - until April 11, 2014 - to properly effectuate service on Defendant. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 03/12/2014. (mlc)
May 19, 2015 65 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION re D.I. 54 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Capitol Cleaners & Launderers Inc.. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 05/19/2015. (mlc)
May 19, 2015 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 65 Memorandum Opinion -- 54 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Capitol Cleaners & Launderers Inc. iS GRANTED, the unresolved portion of 59 MOTION to Withdraw Scheduling Order and for Rule to Show Cause file d by Capitol Cleaners & Launderers Inc. is DENIED AS MOOT, 63 MOTION Reschedule the Scheduleing Order, Pretrial Hearing re 60 Order, filed by Raymond J. Brokenbrough, Jr. is DENIED. Judgment is hereby entered for Defendant and against Plaintiff. ***Civil Case Terminated.. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 05/19/2015. (mlc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brokenbrough v. Capitol Uniform and Linen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond J. Brokenbrough, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capitol Uniform and Linen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.