Greatbatch Ltd. v. AVX Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Greatbatch Ltd.
Defendant: AVX Corporation and AVX Filters Corporation
Case Number: 1:2013cv00723
Filed: April 25, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: New Castle
Presiding Judge: Leonard P. Stark
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1298 MEMORANDUM ORDER re 1273 Post-Trial Motions filed by Greatbatch Ltd. is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART; 1270 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law and For a New Trial filed by AVX Corporation, AVX Filters Corporation is DENIED. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/31/19. (ntl)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1218 MEMORANDUM ORDER re rulings by the Court on motions in limine and other disputed pretrial order issues. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/20/18. (ntl)
March 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1115 MEMORANDUM OPINION re AVX's request to bar Greatbatch's enforcement of the '627 and '095 patents (D.I. 1084) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/30/18. (ntl)
July 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 998 MEMORANDUM ORDER re 936 MOTION to Exclude filed by AVX Corporation, AVX Filters Corporation and 934 MOTION to Exclude filed by Greatbatch Ltd. are GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/20/17. (ntl)
December 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 857 MEMORANDUM ORDER re 751 MOTION to Vacate is DENIED; and resolving various disputes in 778 Status Report. An Oral Argument is set for 1/10/2017 at 10:00 AM on pending motions. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/13/16. (ntl)
January 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 573 MEMORANDUM ORDER re various pretrial rulings. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/5/16. This order has been emailed to local counsel. (ntl) (Main Document 573 unsealed and replaced on 1/7/2016) (ntl). Modified on 1/7/2016 (ntl).
December 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 547 MEMORANDUM ORDER denying re 514 MOTION to Stay Litigation as to U.S. Patent No. 5,905,627 filed by AVX Corporation, AVX Filters Corporation and scheduling oral argument on pending 507 Motion for Sanctions on 12/22/15 at the pretrial conference. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/10/2015. (rpg)
September 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 455 MEMORANDUM ORDER re 386 MOTION to Strike, 419 MOTION to Strike are DENIED. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/22/15. (ntl)
July 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 368 MEMORANDUM ORDER re narrowing the number of asserted patent claims and prior art references; the teleconference scheduled for 8/7/15 is cancelled. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/28/15. (ntl)
March 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 282 MEMORANDUM OPINION re claim construction. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/20/15. (ntl)
February 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MEMORANDUM ORDER Granting 31 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by Greatbatch Ltd. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 2/4/14. (ntl)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greatbatch Ltd. v. AVX Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greatbatch Ltd.
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AVX Corporation
Represented By: Jason James Rawnsley
Represented By: Chad Michael Shandler
Represented By: Robert W. Whetzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AVX Filters Corporation
Represented By: Jason James Rawnsley
Represented By: Chad Michael Shandler
Represented By: Robert W. Whetzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?